Rederij Suomigracht et al
Petitioner: Rederij Suomigracht and Spiethoff's Bevrachtingskantoor B.V.
Claimant: Gerald Dwyer, Spliethoff Houston TX Inc. and Stef Alderding
Case Number: 1:2020cv00086
Filed: March 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Marcia A Crone
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1333 Admiralty
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2021 Filing 33 FINAL JUDGMENT dismissing this action with prejudice. All costs of court will be borne by the party incurring same. Signed by District Judge Marcia A. Crone on 7/27/21. (tkd, )
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDERED that this case is dismissed on the merits without prejudice to the right of counsel of record to move for reinstatement within ninety (90) days upon presentation of adequate proof that final approval of the settlement could not be obtained from the respective principals for whom counsel act. Any outstanding motions are conditionally denied as moot pending final settlement papers. Signed by District Judge Marcia A. Crone on 6/18/2021. (bjc, )
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #30 Motion to Consolidate Cases. This action is consolidated into Lead Case 1:19cv623. ALL FUTURE FILINGS WILL BE MADE IN THE LEAD CASE. This action is administratively closed due to this consolidation. Signed by District Judge Marcia A. Crone on 7/27/20. (tkd, )
July 23, 2020 Filing 30 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Rederij Suomigracht, Spiethoff's Bevrachtingskantoor B.V.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order)(James, David)
July 23, 2020 Filing 29 BRIEF Regarding Jury Trial and Limitation Injunction by Rederij Suomigracht, Spiethoff's Bevrachtingskantoor B.V. (James, David) Modified on 7/24/2020 (tkd, ).
July 7, 2020 Filing 28 RESPONSE in Opposition re #25 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Response to Sur-Reply and Amended Stipulations filed by Rederij Suomigracht, Spiethoff's Bevrachtingskantoor B.V.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order)(James, David)
July 6, 2020 Filing 27 RESPONSE to Sur-Reply in Opposition to #17 MOTION to Stay and/or Dissolve this Action and Lift Injunction Against Prosecution of Underlying Case filed by Gerald Dwyer. (Bond, J) Modified on 7/7/2020 (tkd, ).
July 6, 2020 Filing 26 AMENDED STIPULATION re #17 MOTION to Stay and/or Dissolve this Action and Lift Injunction Against Prosecution of Underlying Case by Gerald Dwyer. (Bond, J) Modified on 7/7/2020 (tkd, ).
July 6, 2020 Filing 25 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Response to Sur-Reply and Amended Stipulations by Gerald Dwyer. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bond, J)
July 2, 2020 Filing 24 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #17 MOTION to Stay and/or Dissolve this Action and Lift Injunction Against Prosecution of Underlying Case filed by Rederij Suomigracht, Spiethoff's Bevrachtingskantoor B.V.. (James, David)
June 29, 2020 Filing 23 REPLY to Response to Motion re #17 MOTION to Stay and/or Dissolve this Action and Lift Injunction Against Prosecution of Underlying Case filed by Gerald Dwyer. (Bond, J)
June 23, 2020 Filing 22 RESPONSE in Opposition re #17 MOTION to Stay and/or Dissolve this Action and Lift Injunction Against Prosecution of Underlying Case filed by Rederij Suomigracht, Spiethoff's Bevrachtingskantoor B.V.. (James, David)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #20 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #17 MOTION to Stay and/or Dissolve this Action and Lift Injunction Against Prosecution of Underlying Case. Responses due by 6/23/2020. Signed by District Judge Marcia A. Crone on 6/18/20. (tkd, )
June 17, 2020 Filing 20 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #17 MOTION to Stay and/or Dissolve this Action and Lift Injunction Against Prosecution of Underlying Case by Rederij Suomigracht, Spiethoff's Bevrachtingskantoor B.V.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(James, David)
June 5, 2020 Filing 19 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Stef Alderding, Spliethoff Houston TX Inc. (Schovajsa, Christina)
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #13 Motion for leave to file an amended claim. Signed by District Judge Marcia A. Crone on 6/3/20. (tkd, )
June 3, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION to Stay and/or Dissolve this Action and Lift Injunction Against Prosecution of Underlying Case by Gerald Dwyer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Stipulation, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Bond, J)
June 1, 2020 Filing 16 CLAIM by Spliethoff Houston TX Inc., Stef Alderding. (Klawetter, Robert)
May 22, 2020 Filing 15 Verification re #14 Amended Claim of Gerald Dwyer by Gerald Dwyer. (Bond, J) Modified on 5/26/2020 (tkd, ).
May 22, 2020 Filing 14 AMENDED CLAIM for Personal Injury by Gerald Dwyer. (Bond, J) Modified on 5/26/2020 (tkd, ).
May 22, 2020 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amended Claim by Gerald Dwyer. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bond, J)
May 21, 2020 Filing 12 RESPONSE to #9 Claim of Gerald Dwyer by Rederij Suomigracht, Spiethoff's Bevrachtingskantoor B.V.. (James, David)
April 28, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE by Rederij Suomigracht, Spiethoff's Bevrachtingskantoor B.V. of Certificate of Publication (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(James, David)
April 20, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Gerald Dwyer.(Bond, J)
April 20, 2020 Filing 9 CLAIM by Gerald Dwyer. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Bond, J) Modified on 4/21/2020 (tkd, ).
April 8, 2020 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Rederij Suomigracht, Spiethoff's Bevrachtingskantoor B.V. (James, David)
March 27, 2020 Issued receipt #TXE100020288 to Clark Hill PLC in the amount of $1,000 for deposit in the Registry of the Court pursuant to #5 Order (tkd, )
March 6, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of complaint and petition for exoneration from or limitation of liability by the Clerk (tkd, )
March 6, 2020 Filing 6 Monition issued (tkd, )
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER approving surety, directing the issuance of monition, and directing the issuance of notice to potential claimants, granting #3 Motion. Signed by District Judge Marcia A. Crone on 3/5/2020. (tkd, )
March 3, 2020 Case Assigned to District Judge Marcia A. Crone. (fal, )
March 3, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE by Rederij Suomigracht, Spiethoff's Bevrachtingskantoor B.V. of Action Brought For Exoneration From, Or Limitation of, Liability (James, David)
March 3, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION For Order Approving Issuance of Monition to Claimants, Restraining Prosecution of Claims, Order of Entry of Stipulation of Value with a Letter of Undertaking and Tender of Costs in Lieu of Bond by Rederij Suomigracht, Spiethoff's Bevrachtingskantoor B.V.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(James, David)
March 3, 2020 Filing 2 STIPULATION For Value With Letter of Undertaking by Rederij Suomigracht, Spiethoff's Bevrachtingskantoor B.V.. (James, David)
March 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Exoneration From or Limitation of Liability against All Parties ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7691498.), filed by Rederij Suomigracht, Spiethoff's Bevrachtingskantoor B.V.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(James, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rederij Suomigracht et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Rederij Suomigracht
Represented By: David Earl James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Spiethoff's Bevrachtingskantoor B.V.
Represented By: David Earl James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Gerald Dwyer
Represented By: J Trenton Bond
Represented By: Scott Oren Renick
Represented By: Chris Michael Portner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Spliethoff Houston TX Inc.
Represented By: Robert L Klawetter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Stef Alderding
Represented By: Robert L Klawetter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?