Dilks et al v. Progressive Flood Insurance Processing et al
Plaintiff: Robert D. Dilks, Katye O'Dell and Robert D Dilks, Jr
Defendant: American Strategic Insurance Corp., Cheryl Biehle, Stephen M. Biehle and Progressive Flood Insurance Processing
Case Number: 1:2020cv00217
Filed: May 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Michael J Truncale
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:4001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2021 Filing 37 ANSWER to #36 Amended Complaint, by Cheryl Biehle, Stephen M. Biehle.(Bennett, Karen)
January 29, 2021 Filing 36 AMENDED COMPLAINT against American Strategic Insurance Corp., Cheryl Biehle, Stephen M. Biehle, filed by Robert D Dilks, Jr, Katye O'Dell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10)(Partain, Bruce)
January 14, 2021 Filing 35 Experts Witness List by Robert D Dilks, Jr, Katye O'Dell. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B)(Partain, Bruce)
November 12, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Keith F. Giblin: Early Neutral Evaluation Conference held on 11/12/2020. Parties appeared before the court by video conference and presented their case to the court. (Court Time: 2:20-3:20 pm.)(Appearance: B. Partian (Pltf Atty); I. Hands (ASI Atty) and K. Bennett (Biehle Atty)(Courtroom Deputy/FTR OP: Sherre White.) (saw, )
November 11, 2020 Filing 34 NOTICE by Cheryl Biehle, Stephen M. Biehle of Filing Initial Disclosure (Bennett, Karen)
November 2, 2020 Filing 33 REPLY to Response to #31 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Cheryl Biehle, Stephen M. Biehle. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bennett, Karen) Modified on 11/2/2020 (kcv, ).
October 26, 2020 Filing 32 RESPONSE in Opposition re #31 MOTION to Dismiss of Biehle Defendants filed by Robert D Dilks, Jr, Katye O'Dell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Partain, Bruce)
October 15, 2020 Filing 31 MOTION to Dismiss by Cheryl Biehle, Stephen M. Biehle. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bennett, Karen)
October 15, 2020 Filing 30 Second Amended ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Cheryl Biehle, Stephen M. Biehle.(Bennett, Karen)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #28 Motion for attorneys Kyla McGee and Dominique Hinson to withdraw, and for attorney Karen Bennett to be substituted as counsel for defts Stephen Biehle and Cheryl Biehle. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 10/14/20. (tkd, )
October 9, 2020 Filing 28 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw and Substitute Counsel by Stephen M. Biehle. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bennett, Karen)
September 24, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE of Second Supplemental Disclosure by Robert D Dilks, Jr, Katye O'Dell re #16 Notice of Disclosure (Partain, Bruce) Modified on 9/25/2020 (tkd, ).
September 23, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE of First Supplemental Disclosure by Robert D Dilks, Jr, Katye O'Dell re #16 Notice of Discovery Disclosure (Partain, Bruce) Modified on 9/24/2020 (tkd, ).
August 19, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE Setting Forth Early Neutral Evaluation Procedures. Signed by Magistrate Judge Keith F. Giblin on 8/19/20. (tkd, )
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER setting Neutral Evaluation Conference for 11/12/2020 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Keith F. Giblin. Signed by Magistrate Judge Keith F. Giblin on 8/19/20. (tkd, )
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediator Judge Giblin. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 8/7/2020. (bjc, )
August 7, 2020 Set/Reset Hearings: Bench Trial set for 9/13/2021 09:00 AM in Ctrm 2 (Beaumont) before District Judge Michael J. Truncale. (bjc, )
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/13/2021 09:00 AM in Ctrm 2 (Beaumont) before District Judge Michael J. Truncale. Bench Trial set for 9/13/2021 at 9:00 a.m. in Ctrm 2 (Beaumont) before District Judge Michael J Truncale. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 8/7/2020. (bjc, )
August 6, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Michael J. Truncale: Case Management Conference held on 8/6/2020 via telephone. Attorneys present: Bruce Partain, Kim Brit, Bradley Jones, Dominique Hinson, Kyla McGee. Court will enter scheduling order. (Court Reporter None present.) (jmv, )
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #19 Joint Stipulation of Dismissal. Pltfs' claims against Progressive Flood Insurance Processing are dismissed with prejudice. Each party will bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 8/5/20. (tkd, )
August 5, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kyla Wilder McGee on behalf of Cheryl Biehle, Stephen M. Biehle (Wilder McGee, Kyla)
July 31, 2020 Filing 19 STIPULATION of Dismissal As to Only Defendant, Progressive Flood Insurance Processing by American Strategic Insurance Corp., Progressive Flood Insurance Processing. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hands, Iliaura)
July 29, 2020 Filing 18 AMENDED ANSWER to Plaintiff's Original Complaint by Cheryl Biehle, Stephen M. Biehle. (Hinson, Dominique)
July 27, 2020 Filing 17 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting - PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER. (Partain, Bruce) Modified on 7/28/2020 (jmv, ).
July 27, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Robert D Dilks, Jr, Katye O'Dell (Partain, Bruce)
July 27, 2020 Filing 15 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Partain, Bruce)
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Setting Civil Action for Rule 16 Mgmt/Scheduling Conference set for 8/6/2020 10:30 AM before District Judge Michael J. Truncale. Attorney Conference should be held on or before 7/17/20. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 6/26/20. (fal, )
June 19, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kim Tran Britt on behalf of American Strategic Insurance Corp., Progressive Flood Insurance Processing (Britt, Kim)
June 16, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Iliaura Hands on behalf of American Strategic Insurance Corp., Progressive Flood Insurance Processing (Hands, Iliaura)
June 15, 2020 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by American Strategic Insurance Corp. identifying Corporate Parent The Progressive Corporation for American Strategic Insurance Corp.. (Jones, Bradley)
June 15, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE by American Strategic Insurance Corp. CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES (Jones, Bradley)
June 15, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by American Strategic Insurance Corp..(Jones, Bradley)
June 15, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert D Dilks, Jr, Katye O'Dell. All Defendants. (Partain, Bruce)
June 12, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Cheryl Biehle, Stephen M. Biehle.(Hinson, Dominique)
June 1, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert D Dilks, Jr, Katye O'Dell. American Strategic Insurance Corp served on 5/27/2020. (Partain, Bruce) Modified on 6/1/2020 (bjc, ).
May 27, 2020 Filing 5 FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE. PREVIOUSLY ISSUED ON 5/22/20SUMMONS Issued as to American Strategic Insurance Corp., Cheryl Biehle, Stephen M. Biehle, Progressive Flood Insurance Processing. (fal, ) Modified on 5/27/2020 (fal, ).
May 26, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert D Dilks, Jr, Katye O'Dell. All Defendants. (Partain, Bruce)
May 26, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert D Dilks, Jr, Katye O'Dell. All Defendants. (Partain, Bruce)
May 22, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONSES Issued as to American Strategic Insurance Corp., Cheryl Biehle, Stephen M. Biehle, Progressive Flood Insurance Processing. (tkd, )
May 22, 2020 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (tkd, )
May 22, 2020 Case assigned to District Judge Michael J. Truncale. (tkd, )
May 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7803638.), filed by Robert D. Dilks, Katye O'Dell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Partain, Bruce) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/21/2020: #8 Civil Cover Sheet) (fal, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dilks et al v. Progressive Flood Insurance Processing et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert D. Dilks
Represented By: Bruce Manuel Partain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katye O'Dell
Represented By: Bruce Manuel Partain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert D Dilks, Jr
Represented By: Bruce Manuel Partain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Strategic Insurance Corp.
Represented By: Kim Tran Britt
Represented By: Iliaura Hands
Represented By: Bradley K Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cheryl Biehle
Represented By: Dominique Nicole Hinson
Represented By: Karen Renee Bennett
Represented By: Kyla Wilder McGee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen M. Biehle
Represented By: Dominique Nicole Hinson
Represented By: Karen Renee Bennett
Represented By: Kyla Wilder McGee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Flood Insurance Processing
Represented By: Kim Tran Britt
Represented By: Iliaura Hands
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?