Beasley v. Warden, USP Beaumont
Petitioner: Christopher Maurice Beasley
Respondent: Warden, USP Beaumont
Case Number: 1:2020cv00260
Filed: June 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Zack Hawthorn
Referring Judge: Michael J Truncale
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2020 Filing 8 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Michael Lockhart on 7/28/20 as to #6 Show Cause Order. (ljw, )
July 29, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Amended Supplement by Christopher Maurice Beasley (ljw, )
July 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER. ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall issue process and Respondent shall have sixty (60) days from the date of service of process to answer the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and show cause why relief prayed for should not be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 7/19/2020. (ttp, ) (
July 17, 2020 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number TXE100020614 (tkd, )
July 8, 2020 Filing 5 RESPONSE to #3 Order by Christopher Maurice Beasley. (bjc, )
July 6, 2020 Filing 4 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Christopher Maurice Beasley on 6/30/2020 re #3 Order. (bjc, )
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDERED that Christopher Maurice Beasley shall, within 20 days from the date set forth below, submit the filing fee or an application to proceed in forma pauperis accompanied by a statement prepared by an authorized BOP official showing the average balance and average deposits to petitioner's inmate trust account for the preceding six months. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 6/15/2020. (bjc, )
June 10, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Christopher Maurice Beasley. (bjc, )
June 10, 2020 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn. (bjc, )
June 10, 2020 Filing 1 28:2241 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Christopher Maurice Beasley. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(bjc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beasley v. Warden, USP Beaumont
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Christopher Maurice Beasley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden, USP Beaumont
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?