Ali v. Warden USP-Beaumont
Petitioner: Jesus Thomas Ali
Respondent: Warden USP-Beaumont
Case Number: 1:2020cv00348
Filed: August 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Zack Hawthorn
Referring Judge: Michael J Truncale
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2020 Filing 6 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Jesus Thomas Ali on 9/30/2020 re #4 Order to Show Cause. (bjc, )
October 1, 2020 Filing 5 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT on 09/28/2020 as to #4 Order to Show Cause and #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (bmf, )
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. The Clerk of Court shall issue process, and the respondent shall have sixty(60) days from the date of service of process to answer the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. The petitioners reply to the respondents answer, if any, shall be filed within twenty-one days from the filing date of the respondents answer. Copy of order mailed to U.S. Attorneys Office. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 09/22/2020. (bmf, ) Modified text on 9/23/2020 (bmf, ).
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 09/22/2020. (bmf, )
September 4, 2020 Filing 2 APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Jesus Thomas Ali. (bmf, )
August 12, 2020 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn. (bmf, )
August 12, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Jesus Thomas Ali. (Mailed Application for IFP on 08/13/2020).(bmf, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ali v. Warden USP-Beaumont
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden USP-Beaumont
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jesus Thomas Ali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?