MOORE et al v. TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. et al
Plaintiff: Crystal Moore
Defendant: TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, LLC, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC., TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, LLC f/k/a TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC., The Cooper Companies Inc, Coopersurgical Inc and DURAMED PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. A DIVISION OF BARR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. D/B/A TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC.
Debtor In Possession: TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH INC., INDVIDIUALLY, AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO, DURAMED PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. A DIVISION OF BARR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00369
Filed: September 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Michael J Truncale
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/8/2022 09:00 AM in Ctrm 2 (Beaumont) and Jury Trial set for 9/12/2022 09:00 AM in Ctrm 2 (Beaumont) before District Judge Michael J. Truncale. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 11/6/2020. (kcv, )
November 5, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Michael J. Truncale: Case Management Conference held on 11/5/2020 via teleconference. Attorneys present: Randi Kassan, Lauren Welling, Frederick Erny, Laura DeSantos. Court will enter scheduling order. (Court Reporter None.) (jmv, )
October 27, 2020 Filing 23 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Appendix 1 Proposed Scheduling Order Deadlines)(DeSantos, Laura)
October 22, 2020 NOTICE of Hearing: Case Management Conference RESET for 11/5/2020 02:30 PM before District Judge Michael J. Truncale via telephone. (jmv, )
October 21, 2020 Filing 22 RESPONSE to Motion re #20 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending a Decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation filed by Coopersurgical Inc, DURAMED PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. A DIVISION OF BARR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. D/B/A TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC., TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH INC., INDVIDIUALLY, AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO, DURAMED PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. A DIVISION OF BARR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, LLC f/k/a TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, LLC, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC., The Cooper Companies Inc. (DeSantos, Laura)
October 21, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Frederick M Erny on behalf of Coopersurgical Inc, TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH INC., INDVIDIUALLY, AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO, DURAMED PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. A DIVISION OF BARR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, LLC f/k/a TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, LLC, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC., The Cooper Companies Inc (Erny, Frederick)
October 21, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending a Decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation by Crystal Moore. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Kassan, Randi) (Attachment 1 replaced on 10/21/2020) (rpc, ). Modified text on 10/22/2020 (kcv, ).
October 7, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Laura E DeSantos on behalf of All Defendants (DeSantos, Laura)
September 28, 2020 Filing 18 RECEIVED copy of Motion to Transfer Actions to the Central District of California, MDL Case No. 137. (bmf, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/29/2020: #1 Proof of Service, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Schedule of Actions, #4 Envelope) (bmf, ).
September 28, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Randi Alyson Kassan on behalf of Crystal Moore (Kassan, Randi)
September 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Setting Civil Action for Rule 16 Management Conference is set for 10/30/2020 at 11:30 AM via telephone conference before District Judge Michael J. Truncale. Rule 26(f) Attorney Conference on or before October 13, 2020. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 09/26/2020. (bmf) Modified text on 9/28/2020 (bmf, ).
September 21, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Tobias L Millrood on behalf of Crystal Moore. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8013538. (Millrood, Tobias)
September 8, 2020 The following attorneys were contacted by email on 9/8/2020 regarding admission requirements to the Eastern District of TX: Attorney Kara D Hill, Timothy M Clark and Tobias Millrood for Plaintiff; Attorney Brian Rubenstein, Frederick M Erny for defendants. (bjc, )
September 8, 2020 Case assigned to District Judge Michael J. Truncale. (bjc, )
September 8, 2020 Filing 14 Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number 2:20-cv-04142. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 8, 2020 Original record transferred to the Eastern District of Texas (Beaumont Division) via interdistrict transfer system. (md, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/8/2020.]
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER THAT THE STIPULATION OF THE PARTIES TO TRANSFER VENUE OF THIS ACTION TO THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF TEXAS, BEAUMONT DIVISION, IS HEREBY APPROVED, AND FOR THE REASONS SET FORTH IN THE STIPULATION, THIS COURTS MEMORANDUM (DOC. NO. 19) AND ORDER (DOC. NO. 20) IN WILLIAMS-HOLLEY V. TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., CIVIL ACTION NO. 20-1613(HB)(E.D. PA. AUGUST 4, 2020), AND IN THIS COURTS MEMORANDUM IN BARCELO V. TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., CIVIL ACTION NO. 18-3984, 2019 WL 6117305 (E.D. PA. NOV. 18, 2019), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT THIS ACTION IS TRANSFERRED PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1404(A) TO UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF TEXAS, BEAUMONT DIVISION.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 8/31/20. 9/1/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/8/2020.]
August 31, 2020 Filing 12 STIPULATION TO TRANSFER VENUE TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF TEXAS, BEAUMONT DIVISION. Certificate of Service. (va, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/8/2020.]
August 24, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, LLC f/k/a TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, LLC, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC..(RUBENSTEIN, BRIAN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/8/2020.]
August 24, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH INC., INDVIDIUALLY, AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO, DURAMED PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. A DIVISION OF BARR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC..(RUBENSTEIN, BRIAN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/8/2020.]
August 24, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC..(RUBENSTEIN, BRIAN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/8/2020.]
August 24, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC..(RUBENSTEIN, BRIAN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/8/2020.]
August 24, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by COOPERSURGICAL, INC..(RUBENSTEIN, BRIAN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/8/2020.]
August 24, 2020 Filing 6 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, LLC f/k/a TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, LLC, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC..(RUBENSTEIN, BRIAN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/8/2020.]
August 24, 2020 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH INC., INDVIDIUALLY, AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO, DURAMED PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. A DIVISION OF BARR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC..(RUBENSTEIN, BRIAN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/8/2020.]
August 24, 2020 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC..(RUBENSTEIN, BRIAN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/8/2020.]
August 24, 2020 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by COOPERSURGICAL, INC..(RUBENSTEIN, BRIAN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/8/2020.]
August 24, 2020 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC..(RUBENSTEIN, BRIAN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/8/2020.]
August 24, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by DURAMED PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. A DIVISION OF BARR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. D/B/A TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, LLC, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH INC., INDVIDIUALLY, AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO, DURAMED PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. A DIVISION OF BARR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., COOPERSURGICAL, INC., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, LLC f/k/a TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC., THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14515248), from the Court of Common Pleas of Philadelphia County Case No. 200401399, filed by DURAMED PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. A DIVISION OF BARR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. D/B/A TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, LLC, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH INC., INDVIDIUALLY, AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO, DURAMED PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. A DIVISION OF BARR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., COOPERSURGICAL, INC., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, LLC f/k/a TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC., THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC..(RUBENSTEIN, BRIAN) Modified on 8/24/2020 (md, ).[Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/8/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MOORE et al v. TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystal Moore
Represented By: Randi Alyson Kassan
Represented By: Tobias L Millrood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, LLC, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC.
Represented By: Laura E DeSantos
Represented By: Frederick M Erny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA Inc
Represented By: Laura E DeSantos
Represented By: Frederick M Erny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, LLC f/k/a TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC.
Represented By: Laura E DeSantos
Represented By: Frederick M Erny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Cooper Companies Inc
Represented By: Laura E DeSantos
Represented By: Frederick M Erny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coopersurgical Inc
Represented By: Laura E DeSantos
Represented By: Frederick M Erny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DURAMED PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. A DIVISION OF BARR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. D/B/A TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC.
Represented By: Laura E DeSantos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor in possession: TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH INC., INDVIDIUALLY, AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO, DURAMED PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. A DIVISION OF BARR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Represented By: Laura E DeSantos
Represented By: Frederick M Erny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?