Allen v. YRC Inc
Plaintiff: Mary Lorraine Allen
Defendant: YRC Worldwide, Inc., and YRC Inc. doing business as YRC Freight
Case Number: 1:2020cv00373
Filed: September 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Marcia A Crone
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2020 Filing 10 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by YRC Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Scheduling Order)(Clark, Shauna)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion to correct the name of defendant. Signed by District Judge Marcia A. Crone on 10/5/2020. (bjc, )
October 3, 2020 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint and Correct the Name of Defendant by Mary Lorraine Allen. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Franklin, Tanner)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER to conduct Rule 26(f) conference no later than October 30, 2020. Joint written report filed no later than November 13, 2020. Signed by District Judge Marcia A. Crone on 10/1/2020. (bjc, )
October 1, 2020 NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 11/30/2020 at 2:00 PM in chambers (Beaumont) before District Judge Marcia A. Crone. (jc, )
September 30, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of interested parties filed by YRC Worldwide, Inc., (Clark, Shauna) Modified on 10/1/2020 (bjc, ).
September 30, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by YRC Worldwide, Inc.,. (bjc, )
September 30, 2020 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (bjc, )
September 30, 2020 Filing 5 Original ANSWER to #1 Complaint by YRC Worldwide, Inc.,.(Clark, Shauna)
September 9, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued and emailed to plaintiff's attorney for service as to YRC Worldwide, Inc. (bjc, )
September 9, 2020 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (bjc, )
September 9, 2020 Case assigned to District Judge Marcia A. Crone. (bjc, )
September 9, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Mary Lorraine Allen. (bjc, )
September 9, 2020 Filing 3 Additional Attachments to Main Document: Exhibit B to #1 Complaint.. (Franklin, Tanner)
September 9, 2020 Filing 2 Additional Attachments to Main Document: Exhibit A to #1 Complaint.. (Franklin, Tanner)
September 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against YRC Worldwide, Inc., ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7991072.), filed by Mary Lorraine Allen. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Franklin, Tanner)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allen v. YRC Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Lorraine Allen
Represented By: Tanner Gerald McClure Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YRC Worldwide, Inc.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YRC Inc. doing business as YRC Freight
Represented By: Shauna Johnson Clark
Represented By: Heather Lynn Sherrod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?