Peregoy v. MCLOBA, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Alton S. Peregoy
Respondent: McLoba Inc, U.S. Gold Firm, L.L.C., McLoba Partners Ltd, Michael L. Chester and Troy Snody
Case Number: 1:2020cv00461
Filed: November 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Michael J Truncale
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1961
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Michael J. Truncale: Status Conference held on 12/14/2020 via telephone. Attorneys present: Raymond Stevens, Chris Portner, Trent Bond, Scott Renick. Court will enter scheduling order. (Court Reporter None.) (jmv, )
December 7, 2020 Filing 36 NOTICE by Michael L. Chester, McLoba Inc, McLoba Partners Ltd, Alton S. Peregoy, Troy Snody, U.S. Gold Firm, L.L.C. Filing Proposed Scheduling Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Portner, Chris)
December 1, 2020 NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference RESET for 12/14/2020 02:30 PM before District Judge Michael J. Truncale via telephone. (jmv, )
November 30, 2020 Filing 35 REPLY to Response to Motion re #31 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Alton S. Peregoy's First Amended Complaint filed by Michael L. Chester, McLoba Inc, McLoba Partners Ltd, Troy Snody, U.S. Gold Firm, L.L.C.. (Portner, Chris)
November 24, 2020 Filing 34 RESPONSE in Opposition re #31 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Alton S. Peregoy's First Amended Complaint filed by Alton S. Peregoy. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G)(Stevens, Raymond)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER setting Status Conference for 12/11/2020 02:30 PM via telephone before District Judge Michael J. Truncale. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 11/13/2020. (bjc, )
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #30 Motion for Leave to File motion to dismiss in excess of 30 pages. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 11/13/2020. (bjc, )
November 12, 2020 Filing 31 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Alton S. Peregoy's First Amended Complaint by Michael L. Chester, McLoba Inc, McLoba Partners Ltd, Troy Snody, U.S. Gold Firm, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Portner, Chris) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/13/2020: #2 Text of Proposed Order) (bjc, ).
November 12, 2020 Filing 30 MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Dismiss in Excess of Thirty Pages by Michael L. Chester, McLoba Inc, McLoba Partners Ltd, Troy Snody, U.S. Gold Firm, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Portner, Chris)
November 12, 2020 Filing 29 Case transferred in from District of Texas Southern; Case Number 2:20-cv-00163. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
November 12, 2020 Case Assigned to District Judge Michael J. Truncale. (bjc, )
November 12, 2020 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (bjc, )
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER TO TRANSFER CASE to Eastern District of Texas, Beaumont Division; The Court denies Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. (Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(vrios, 2) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 11/12/2020.]
November 10, 2020 Interdistrict transfer to Eastern District of Texas, Beaumont Division. Case transferred electronically. Case terminated on 11/10/20, filed. (vrios, 2) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 11/12/2020.]
November 10, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos. INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 11/10/2020. Parties give summary of the case. A order denying the motion to dismiss was filed in the Beaumont case on 11/9/2020. Court will review the Beaumont case order. Court will likely transfer our case to the Beaumont court by written order. Court does not enter a scheduling order in this case at this time. Appearances: Scott Oren Renick, Christopher Michael Portner, Raymond Lyn Stevens.(Digital # 9:01-9:12)(ERO:G. Rogan), filed.(bcortez, 2) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 11/12/2020.]
November 9, 2020 Filing 27 RESPONSE in Opposition to #26 MOTION DEFENDANTS MCLOBA, INC., MCLOBA PARTNERS, LTD. U.S. GOLD FIRM, LLC, TROY SNODY AND MICHAEL CHESTER'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT, filed by Alton S Peregoy. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Order)(Stevens, Raymond) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 11/12/2020.]
November 4, 2020 Filing 26 MOTION DEFENDANTS MCLOBA, INC., MCLOBA PARTNERS, LTD. U.S. GOLD FIRM, LLC, TROY SNODY AND MICHAEL CHESTER'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Michael L. Chester, MCLOBA PARTNERS, LTD, MCLOBA, Inc., Troy Snody, U.S. Gold Firm, L.L.C., filed. Motion Docket Date 11/11/2020. (legarza, 2) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 11/12/2020.]
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART #24 MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Dismiss in Excess of 25 Pages (Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(legarza, 2) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 11/12/2020.]
November 3, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Dismiss in Excess of 25 Pages by Michael L. Chester, MCLOBA PARTNERS, LTD, MCLOBA, Inc., Troy Snody, U.S. Gold Firm, L.L.C., filed. Motion Docket Date 11/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (part 1), #2 Exhibit A (part 2), #3 Exhibit A (part 3), #4 Exhibit A (part 4), #5 Exhibit A (part 5), #6 Exhibit A (part 6), #7 Exhibit A (part 7), #8 Exhibit A (part 8), #9 Exhibit A (part 9), #10 Exhibit A (part 10), #11 Exhibit A (part 11), #12 Exhibit A (part 12), #13 Exhibit A (part 13), #14 Exhibit A (part 14), #15 Exhibit A (part 15), #16 Exhibit A (part 16), #17 Exhibit A (part 17), #18 Exhibit A (part 18), #19 Exhibit A (part 19), #20 Proposed Order)(Portner, Christopher) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 11/12/2020.]
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER striking #12 Motion to Dismiss.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(JessieHutchinson, 2) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 11/12/2020.]
October 26, 2020 Filing 22 JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Alton S Peregoy, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Agreed Scheduling Order)(Stevens, Raymond) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 11/12/2020.]
October 13, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Resetting. Parties notified. Initial Conference reset for 11/10/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos, filed. Parties are to appear by telephone. Please call the Meet Me Line at 361-693-6446 ten (10) minutes prior to hearing. When prompted for the conference ID, dial 26446#. When prompted for the conference PIN, dial 13579#. Once you call the number, you will be connected to the meet-me-line; there will be silence so please hold until the Case Manager calls in to connect all parties. (bcortez, 2) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 11/12/2020.]
October 12, 2020 Filing 20 REPLY to Response to #12 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, filed by Michael L. Chester, MCLOBA PARTNERS, LTD, MCLOBA, Inc., Troy Snoddy, U.S. Gold Firm, L.L.C.. (Portner, Christopher) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 11/12/2020.]
October 5, 2020 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition to #12 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, filed by Alton S Peregoy. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Authenticity, #2 Appendix, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Proposed Order)(Stevens, Raymond) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 11/12/2020.]
September 24, 2020 Filing 18 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by MCLOBA PARTNERS, LTD, U.S. Gold Firm, L.L.C., filed.(Portner, Christopher) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 11/12/2020.]
September 23, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Resetting. Parties notified. Initial Conference set for 11/12/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos, filed. (Reset at request of parties - see D.E. 16.) (bcortez, 2) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 11/12/2020.]
September 22, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Pending Action in Companion Case by Alton S Peregoy, filed. (Stevens, Raymond) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 11/12/2020.]
September 16, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Initial Disclosure by Michael L. Chester, MCLOBA PARTNERS, LTD, MCLOBA, Inc., Troy Snoddy, U.S. Gold Firm, L.L.C., filed. (Portner, Christopher) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 11/12/2020.]
September 16, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Compliance of Service of Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures by Alton S Peregoy, filed. (Stevens, Raymond) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 11/12/2020.]
September 16, 2020 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Alton S Peregoy, filed.(Stevens, Raymond) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 11/12/2020.]
September 14, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Michael L. Chester, MCLOBA PARTNERS, LTD, MCLOBA, Inc., Troy Snoddy, U.S. Gold Firm, L.L.C., filed. Motion Docket Date 10/5/2020. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Authentcity, #2 Exhibit 1 (part 1), #3 Exhibit 1 (part 2), #4 Exhibit 1 (part 3), #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 6, #10 Exhibit 7, #11 Exhibit 8, #12 Exhibit 9, #13 Exhibit 10, #14 Exhibit 11, #15 Exhibit 12, #16 Exhibit 13, #17 Exhibit 14, #18 Exhibit 15, #19 Proposed Order)(Portner, Christopher) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 11/12/2020.]
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER terminating as moot #7 Motion to Dismiss; terminating #8 Motion to Dismiss.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(fcarbia, 2) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 11/12/2020.]
September 9, 2020 Filing 10 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Alton S Peregoy.(Stevens, Raymond) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 11/12/2020.]
August 24, 2020 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by MCLOBA, Inc., filed.(Portner, Christopher) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 11/12/2020.]
August 24, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss by Michael L. Chester, MCLOBA, Inc., Troy Snoddy, U.S. Gold Firm, L.L.C., filed. Motion Docket Date 9/14/2020. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Authenticity, #2 Exhibit 1 (part 1), #3 Exhibit 1 (part 2), #4 Exhibit 1 (part 3), #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 6, #10 Exhibit 7, #11 Exhibit 8, #12 Exhibit 9, #13 Exhibit 10, #14 Exhibit 11, #15 Exhibit 12, #16 Exhibit 13, #17 Exhibit 14, #18 Exhibit 15, #19 Proposed Order)(Portner, Christopher) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 11/12/2020.]
August 24, 2020 Filing 7 ENTERED IN ERROR - PLEASE SEE FOLLOWING ENTRY #8 FOR CORRECTED MOTION AND ATTACHMENTS MOTION to Dismiss by Michael L. Chester, MCLOBA, Inc., Troy Snoddy, U.S. Gold Firm, L.L.C., filed. Motion Docket Date 9/14/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (part 1), #2 Exhibit 1 (part 2), #3 Exhibit 1 (part 3), #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14. [Transferred from Texas Southern on 11/12/2020.]
August 24, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Resetting. Parties notified. Initial Conference set for 10/8/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos, filed. Joint Plan due 9/24/2020. (Reset at joint request of parties.) (bcortez, 2) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 11/12/2020.]
July 28, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Michael L. Chester served on 7/8/2020, answer due 9/8/2020, filed.(Stevens, Raymond) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 11/12/2020.]
July 28, 2020 Filing 4 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Troy Snoddy, WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Troy Snoddy served on 7/8/2020, answer due 9/8/2020, filed.(Stevens, Raymond) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 11/12/2020.]
July 28, 2020 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to MCLOBA, Inc. served on 7/8/2020, answer due 9/8/2020, filed.(Stevens, Raymond) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 11/12/2020.]
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 9/10/2020 at 09:00 AM in 3rd Floor Courtroom before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos Parties notified.(BrittanyPainschab, 2) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 11/12/2020.]
June 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-24805372) filed by Alton S Peregoy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Stevens, Raymond) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 11/12/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peregoy v. MCLOBA, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: McLoba Inc
Represented By: Chris Michael Portner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: U.S. Gold Firm, L.L.C.
Represented By: Chris Michael Portner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: McLoba Partners Ltd
Represented By: Chris Michael Portner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Michael L. Chester
Represented By: Scott Oren Renick
Represented By: Chris Michael Portner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Troy Snody
Represented By: Chris Michael Portner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alton S. Peregoy
Represented By: Raymond Lyn Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?