Taylor v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Joseph F Taylor
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated and Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Case Number: 1:2021cv00220
Filed: May 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Michael J Truncale
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Dismissing Case with Prejudice. It is further ORDERED that all court dates and pending deadlines are hereby vacated, and all pending motions in this matter be DENIED as moot. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 05/18/2021. (bmf, )
May 14, 2021 Filing 11 STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Joseph F Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schulte, Steven) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/14/2021: #2 Revised Proposed Order) (kcv, ).
May 13, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven Scott Schulte on behalf of Joseph F Taylor (Schulte, Steven)
May 12, 2021 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent Becton Dickinson and Company for C R Bard Incorporated; Corporate Parent C. R. Bard, Inc. for Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated. (Griffith, Joseph)
May 12, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Allison Marie Stewart on behalf of All Defendants (Stewart, Allison)
May 12, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joseph P Griffith on behalf of All Defendants (Griffith, Joseph)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDERED that Rule 26(f) attorney conference must occur by May 28, 2021. Rule 16 Case Management/Scheduling Conference set for 6/18/2021 02:30 PM, in Room 221, (Beaumont) before District Judge Michael J. Truncale. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 5/11/2021. (bjc, )
May 10, 2021 The following attorneys were contacted via email on 5/10/2021 regarding admission requirements to the Eastern District of TX: Plaintiff's attorney - Arati C Furness; and Defendants attorney - Richard B North Jr. (bjc, )
May 10, 2021 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:19-cv-02699. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
May 7, 2021 Remark: Transferring Case to the Eastern District of Texas via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 5/10/2021.]
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 AMENDED FINAL SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 4/26/21. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 5/10/2021.]
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 *AMENDED by Doc. #4 --FINAL SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 4/20/21. (MAP) Modified on 4/29/2021 (SJF). [Transferred from Arizona on 5/10/2021.]
April 29, 2019 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G. Campbell, with member case number: CV-19-2699-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 5/10/2021.]
April 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16842714 filed by Joseph F Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 5/10/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated
Represented By: Joseph P Griffith
Represented By: Allison Marie Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Represented By: Joseph P Griffith
Represented By: Allison Marie Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph F Taylor
Represented By: Matthew Ryan McCarley
Represented By: Steven Scott Schulte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?