Hryhorchuk et al v. Chaparral Manufacturing, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Kenneth Hryhorchuk and Karen Hryhorchuk
Defendant: Doonan Specialized Trailer, LLC, Chaparral Manufacturing, Inc. and Great Western Leasing and Sales
Case Number: 1:2021cv00300
Filed: June 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Michael J Truncale
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2021 Filing 23 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Luke Charles Carrabba on behalf of Great Western Leasing and Sales (Carrabba, Luke)
July 29, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Blake William Gipson on behalf of Great Western Leasing and Sales (Gipson, Blake)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 SCHEDULING ORDER setting various deadlines. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/28/2022 09:00 AM in Ctrm 2 (Beaumont) before District Judge Michael J. Truncale. Jury Selection and Trial set for 8/1/2022 09:00 AM in Ctrm 2 (Beaumont) before District Judge Michael J. Truncale. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 7/28/2021. (bjc, )
July 28, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Michael J. Truncale: Case Management Conference held on 7/28/2021. Attorneys present: David Dies, David Miller. Court will enter scheduling order. (Court Reporter None.) (jmv, )
July 27, 2021 ***FILED IN ERROR. Documents # 19, and # 20, NOTICES of Attorney Appearance, were filed in error. The appearing/signing attorneys were not the filing attorneys. Counsel has been notified. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (kcv, )
July 27, 2021 Filing 20 ***FILED IN ERROR. Please ignore.***NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David L Miller on behalf of Great Western Leasing and Sales (Miller, David) Modified on 7/28/2021 (kcv, ).
July 27, 2021 Filing 19 ***FILED IN ERROR. Please ignore.***NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David L Miller on behalf of Great Western Leasing and Sales (Miller, David) Modified on 7/28/2021 (kcv, ).
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Leave to File response to plaintiffs' motion to remand. The clerk is instructed to make Defendant's response in opposition to plaintiffs motion to remand (dkt 17) part of the record in this matter. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 7/21/2021. (bjc, )
July 19, 2021 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Remand filed by Great Western Leasing and Sales. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Denying Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand)(Miller, David) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/20/2021: #3 Revised Proposed Order) (bjc, ).
July 19, 2021 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand by Great Western Leasing and Sales. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Leave of Court)(Miller, David) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/20/2021: #4 Revised Proposed Order) (bjc, ).
July 19, 2021 Filing 15 STATUS REPORT JOINT CONFERENCE REPORT by Great Western Leasing and Sales. (Miller, David)
July 16, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE by Great Western Leasing and Sales Initial Disclosures (Miller, David)
July 8, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Karen Hryhorchuk, Kenneth Hryhorchuk (Dies, David)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Dismiss Doonan Specialized Trailer LLC. Plaintiffs' claims as to Defendant Doonan Specialized Trailer LLC are hereby dismissed with prejudice. and that with respect to these claims only, the parties shall bear their own attorneys' fees and costs. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 7/2/2021. (bjc, )
June 24, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Remand by Karen Hryhorchuk, Kenneth Hryhorchuk. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dies, David) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/25/2021: #2 Revised Proposed Order) (bjc, ).
June 24, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss Doonan Specialized Trailer, LLC by Karen Hryhorchuk, Kenneth Hryhorchuk. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff' 'Motion to Dismiss Doonan Specialized Trailer, LLC)(Dies, David)
June 22, 2021 Filing 9 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Doonan Specialized Trailer, LLC. (Gaible, Bruce)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDERED that Rule 26(f) attorney conference must occur by July 5, 2021. Rule 16 Case Management/Scheduling Conference set for 7/28/2021 10:00 AM in Room 221 (Beaumont) before District Judge Michael J. Truncale.. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 6/14/2021. (bjc, )
June 14, 2021 Filing 7 ***ORIGINALLY FILED IN STATE COURT AND IS INCLUDED IN THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL.*** ANSWER to #2 PETITION by Doonan Specialized Trailer, LLC. (bjc, )
June 14, 2021 Filing 6 ***ORIGINALLY FILED IN STATE COURT AND IS INCLUDED IN THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL.*** FIRST AMENDED ANSWER to #2 PETITION by Great Western Leasing and Sales. (bjc, )
June 14, 2021 Filing 5 ***ORIGINALLY FILED IN STATE COURT AND IS INCLUDED IN THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL.*** ANSWER to #2 PETITION. (bjc, )
June 14, 2021 Filing 4 ***ORIGINALLY FILED IN STATE COURT AND IS INCLUDED IN THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL.*** SECOND AMENDED PETITION against All Defendants.(bjc, )
June 14, 2021 Filing 3 ***ORIGINALLY FILED IN STATE COURT AND IS INCLUDED IN THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL.*** AMENDED PETITION against Chaparral Manufacturing, Inc., Doonan Specialized Trailer, LLC, Great Western Leasing and Sales.(bjc, )
June 14, 2021 Filing 2 ***ORIGINALLY FILED IN STATE COURT AND IS INCLUDED IN THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL.*** PETITION against Chaparral Manufacturing, Inc., Doonan Specialized Trailer, LLC.(bjc, )
June 14, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Doonan Specialized Trailer, LLC Defendant from 136th Judicial District Court, case number D-0205660. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8452954), filed by Doonan Specialized Trailer, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H)(Gaible, Bruce) (Attachment 1 replaced on 6/14/2021 with flatten image) (bjc, ).
June 14, 2021 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Doonan Specialized Trailer, LLC, Great Western Leasing and Sales, Karen Hryhorchuk, Kenneth Hryhorchuk. (bjc, )
June 14, 2021 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (bjc, )
June 14, 2021 Case assigned to District Judge Michael J. Truncale. (bjc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hryhorchuk et al v. Chaparral Manufacturing, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doonan Specialized Trailer, LLC
Represented By: Bruce C Gaible
Represented By: Michael Anthony Descioli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chaparral Manufacturing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great Western Leasing and Sales
Represented By: David L Miller
Represented By: Blake William Gipson
Represented By: Luke Charles Carrabba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Hryhorchuk
Represented By: David Dies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Hryhorchuk
Represented By: David Dies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?