United States of America v. 12 Various Real Properties Located in Beaumont, Jefferson County, Texas
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: 12 Various Real Properties Located in Beaumont, Jefferson County, Texas
Claimant: Julissa Cortez, Eric Arellano, Veronia Arellano, William Lance Garcia, Cheseterica L Davis, Octavia Shaw, Javier Barrios, Jefferson County, Texas, City of Beaumont, Port Of Beaumont, Sabine Neches Navigation District, Jefferson County Drainage District No. 6, City of Bevil Oaks, Jefferson County Emergency Services District No. 1 and Bevil Oaks M.U.D.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00322
Filed: June 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Marcia A Crone
Referring Judge: Zack Hawthorn
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21 U.S.C. ยง 881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2021 Filing 20 CLAIM Verified by Bevil Oaks M.U.D., City of Beaumont, City of Bevil Oaks, Jefferson County Drainage District No. 6, Jefferson County Emergency Services District No. 1, Jefferson County, Texas, Port Of Beaumont, Sabine Neches Navigation District. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Bird, Douglas)
August 20, 2021 Filing 19 Original ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Jefferson County, Texas, City of Beaumont, Port Of Beaumont, Sabine Neches Navigation District, Jefferson County Drainage District No. 6, City of Bevil Oaks, Jefferson County Emergency Services District No. 1, Bevil Oaks M.U.D..(Bird, Douglas)
August 9, 2021 Filing 18 CERTIFIED Mail green card showing receipt of #8 order by Javier Barrios on 8/5/2021. (bjc, )
August 9, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION to cancel Rule 26(d) Conference by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lockhart, Michael)
August 6, 2021 Filing 15 CERTIFIED Mail green card showing receipt of #8 order by William Lance Garcia on 8/4/2021. (bjc, )
July 22, 2021 Filing 14 CERTIFIED Mail green card showing receipt of #8 order by Julissa Cortez on 7/19/2021. (bjc, )
July 22, 2021 Mailed Doc# 8 Order to conduct Rule 26(f) conference to new claimant Javier Barrios by certified mail. (bjc, ) CMRR# 7017 2620 0000 6937 8622
July 21, 2021 Filing 13 SUPPLEMENTAL CLAIM by Javier Barrios.(bjc, )
July 19, 2021 Filing 12 CERTIFIED Mail green card showing receipt of #8 order by Eric Arellano on 7/17/2021. (bjc, )
July 19, 2021 Filing 11 CERTIFIED Mail green card showing receipt of #8 order by Veronia Arellano on 7/17/2021.(bjc, )
July 16, 2021 Filing 16 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Julissa Cortez on 7/16/2021 re #8 Order setting hearing. (bjc, )
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER to conduct Rule 26(f) conference no later than Thursday, August 12, 2021. Joint written report filed no later than Thursday, August 26, 2021. Rule 16 Management/Scheduling Conference set for 9/2/2021 10:00 AM in Ctrm 4 (Beaumont) before Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 7/14/2021. (bjc, ) CMRR# 7017 0190 0000 8079 00241, Davis; 7017 0190 0000 8079 0007, Arellano; 7017 0190 0000 8078 9995, Cortez; 7017 0190 0000 8078 9988- V. Arellano; 7017 0190 0000 8078 9971-Garcia, 7017 0190 0000 8078 9964- Shaw.
July 13, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Octavia Shaw.(bjc, )
July 12, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Cheseterica L Davis.(bjc, )
July 12, 2021 Filing 6 Supplemental CLAIM by Cheseterica L Davis. (bjc, )
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn. Signed by District Judge Marcia A. Crone on 7/7/2021. (bjc, )
July 2, 2021 Filing 4 PRO SE ANSWER to #1 Complaint by William Lance Garcia.(bjc, )
July 1, 2021 Filing 3 CLAIM regarding property at 13420 Wayside Dr Bevil Oaks TX by Eric Arellano, Veronia Arellano. (bjc, )
June 30, 2021 Filing 2 PRO SE ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Julissa Cortez.(bjc, )
June 23, 2021 Case assigned to District Judge Marcia A. Crone. (bjc, )
June 23, 2021 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (bjc, )
June 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Forfeiture in Rem against 12 Various Real Properties Located in Beaumont, Jefferson County, Texas, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lockhart, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. 12 Various Real Properties Located in Beaumont, Jefferson County, Texas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 12 Various Real Properties Located in Beaumont, Jefferson County, Texas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Michael Wayne Lockhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Julissa Cortez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Eric Arellano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Veronia Arellano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: William Lance Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Cheseterica L Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Octavia Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Javier Barrios
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Jefferson County, Texas
Represented By: Douglas Steven Bird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: City of Beaumont
Represented By: Douglas Steven Bird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Port Of Beaumont
Represented By: Douglas Steven Bird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Sabine Neches Navigation District
Represented By: Douglas Steven Bird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Jefferson County Drainage District No. 6
Represented By: Douglas Steven Bird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: City of Bevil Oaks
Represented By: Douglas Steven Bird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Jefferson County Emergency Services District No. 1
Represented By: Douglas Steven Bird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Bevil Oaks M.U.D.
Represented By: Douglas Steven Bird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?