Holmes v. Warden, FCC Beaumont Low
Petitioner: Justin Christopher Holmes
Respondent: Warden, FCC Beaumont Low
Case Number: 1:2021cv00412
Filed: August 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Zack Hawthorn
Referring Judge: Michael J Truncale
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2021 Filing 5 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by the US Attorney for the Warden, FCC Beaumont Low as to #4 Order to Show Cause - Federal Habeas Petition. (bjc, )
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - FEDERAL HABEAS PETITION. Respondent to file response to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Copy of order mailed to U.S. Attorneys Office.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 9/9/2021. (bjc, )
August 30, 2021 Filing fee: $5.00, receipt number TXE100021191 (tkd, )
August 23, 2021 Filing 3 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Justin Christopher Holmes on 8/16/2021 re #2 Order. (bjc, )
August 20, 2021 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number TXE100021186 (tkd, )
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDERED that petitioner shall, within twenty days from the date set forth below, submit the $5.00 filing fee or an application to proceed in forma pauperis accompanied by a statement prepared by an authorized prison official showing the average balance and average deposits to petitioner's inmate trust account for the preceding six months. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 8/10/2021. (bjc, )
August 9, 2021 Filing 1 28:2241 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Justin Christopher Holmes. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(bjc, )
August 9, 2021 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn. (bjc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holmes v. Warden, FCC Beaumont Low
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Justin Christopher Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden, FCC Beaumont Low
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?