Clymer v. Director, TDCJ-CID
Petitioner: James Russel Clymer, Jr
Respondent: Director, TDCJ-CID
Case Number: 1:2021cv00416
Filed: August 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Zack Hawthorn
Referring Judge: Michael J Truncale
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2021 Filing 7 AMENDED PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus against Director, TDCJ-CID, filed by James Russel Clymer, Jr. Related document(s): #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by James Russel Clymer, Jr.(tkd, )
October 4, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to File an Amended 2254 Petition by James Russel Clymer, Jr. (tkd, )
September 20, 2021 Filing 5 LETTER from James Clymer (mailed Gen Ord 15-13 and docket sheet) (tkd, )
September 7, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Change of Address by James Russel Clymer, Jr from Michael Unit to Coffield Unit, 2661 FM 2054, Tennessee Colony, TX 75884. (kcv, )
August 11, 2021 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number 6-57729 (mll, )
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF TRANSFER re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by James Russel Clymer, Jr. ORDERED that the case is TRANSFERRED to the Eastern District of Texas, Beaumont Division. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 8/10/2021. (gsg)
August 10, 2021 Case assigned to District Judge Michael J. Truncale. (bjc, )
August 10, 2021 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn. (bjc, )
August 10, 2021 Case transferred in from Tyler Division on 08/10/2021 Case Number 6:21-cv-307..(bjc, )
August 9, 2021 Filing 2 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge John D. Love (wea, )
August 9, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by James Russel Clymer, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope(s))(wea, )
August 9, 2021 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. MAILED Consent Form to plaintiff. (wea, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clymer v. Director, TDCJ-CID
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: James Russel Clymer, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Director, TDCJ-CID
Represented By: Edward Larry Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?