Moore v. Dobbs
Petitioner: Joshua Moore, J.J. and Jay
Respondent: Dobbs
Case Number: 1:2021cv00418
Filed: August 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Zack Hawthorn
Referring Judge: Thad Heartfield
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2021 Filing 8 Mail Returned as Undeliverable to Joshua Moore as to #7 Report and Recommendation. (envelope indicates "no longer at this address") (kcv, )
September 16, 2021 Filing 7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending that this #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus should be dismissed without prejudice for want of prosecution pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 9/16/21. (kcv, )
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER. It is ordered that petitioner shall, within twenty (20) days, submit the $5.00 filing fee or an application to proceed in forma pauperis accompanied by a statement prepared by an authorized prison official showing the average balance and average deposits to petitioners inmate trust account for the preceding six months. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 8/13/21. (kcv, )
August 11, 2021 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of Rhode Island; Case Number 1:21-cv-00293. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Transferring this Matter to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of TX re: #1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Joshua Moore. So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 8/11/2021. (Jackson, Ryan) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 8/11/2021.]
August 11, 2021 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn. (bjc, )
August 11, 2021 Case assigned to District Judge Thad Heartfield. (bjc, )
August 4, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Dobbs. Responses due by 8/18/2021. (Shah, Milind) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 8/11/2021.]
July 15, 2021 CASE PERMANENTLY ASSIGNED: The Court has determined that this case is related to CR 18-110-JJM, and is permanently assigned to Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. for all further proceedings. (Simoncelli, Michael) Modified on 7/19/2021 (Barletta, Barbara). [Transferred from Rhode Island on 8/11/2021.]
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER entered directing the petitioner to pay the habeas corpus filing fee in the amount of $5.00 or to file a motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis Filing Fee or Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis due on or before 8/4/2021. So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 7/14/2021. (Potter, Carrie) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 8/11/2021.]
July 14, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Joshua Moore. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Potter, Carrie) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/14/2021: #2 letter) (Potter, Carrie). [Transferred from Rhode Island on 8/11/2021.]
July 14, 2021 CASE CONDITIONALLY ASSIGNED to Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. Related Case Number CR18-110-JJM-PAS-2 based upon the indication on the document that a related case previously was assigned to the presiding judge. The assignment is subject to the presiding judge's determination that the cases, in fact, are related. (Potter, Carrie) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 8/11/2021.]
July 14, 2021 CORRECTIVE DOCKET ENTRY Regarding: Case Conditionally Assigned: This case has been electronically filed and processed, however, after a quality control review the following deficiencies were found: Civil Cover Sheet not attached. The filer is directed to file a Civil Cover Sheet within one day. (Potter, Carrie) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 8/11/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore v. Dobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Joshua Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: J.J.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Dobbs
Represented By: Milind M Shah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?