Williamson v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Kimberly Kay Williamson
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security and SSA
Case Number: 1:2021cv00452
Filed: August 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Zack Hawthorn
Referring Judge: Thad Heartfield
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by US Marshal; US Attorney served on 9/3/2021. (tkd, )
September 13, 2021 Filing 8 Marshal's Return of Service Executed as to US Attorney General served by certified mail on 9/8/2021. (bjc, )
September 13, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kimberly Kay Williamson. Commissioner of Social Security Administration served by certified mail on 9/7/2021. (bjc, )
August 25, 2021 Filing 5 Summons issued and mailed to USM for service as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (bjc, )
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE to parties in Social Security Appeal Cases and ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 8/24/2021. (bjc, ) cc: USA
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Ordered that the Clerk of Court shall issue process and the United States Marshal shall serve process by registered or certified mail to (1) the United States attorney for the Eastern District of Texas, (2) the Attorney General of the United States at Washington, D.C., and (3) the Defendant Commissioner of Social Security Administration. Defendant shall have sixty days after service of the complaint in which to answer or otherwise plead to the claims set forth in the Plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 8/24/2021. (bjc, )
August 23, 2021 Case assigned to District Judge Thad Heartfield. (bjc, )
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn pursuant to GO 05-06. (bjc, )
August 23, 2021 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (bjc, )
August 20, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Kimberly Kay Williamson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Olinsky, Howard)
August 20, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Kimberly Kay Williamson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Notice of Appeals Council Action, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Olinsky, Howard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williamson v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Kay Williamson
Represented By: Howard David Olinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?