Williams v. Warden, USP Beaumont
Petitioner: Romalis Williams
Respondent: Warden, USP Beaumont
Case Number: 1:2021cv00495
Filed: October 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Zack Hawthorn
Referring Judge: Michael J Truncale
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - FEDERAL HABEAS PETITION. Respondent to file response to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus within 60 days. Copy of order mailed to U.S. Attorneys Office. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 11/15/21. (tkd, )
November 8, 2021 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number TXE100021246 (tkd, )
October 25, 2021 Filing 4 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Romalis Williams on 10/19/21 as to #3 Order. (tkd, )
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER directing petitioner to submit within 20 days either the $5 filing fee or an IFP application along with a certified account statement from the prison. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 10/4/21. (tkd, )
October 1, 2021 Filing 2 28:2241 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Romalis Williams. [Transferred from ED/LA case no. 18-154](kcv, )
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 ORDER transferring Motion for Credit Prior to Sentencing Date from the Eastern District of Louisiana case no. 18-154 to be filed in the Eastern District of Texas as a 28 2241 Habeas Corpus petition. Order, Docket Sheet and Cover Letter received. (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet, #2 Cover Letter)(kcv, )
October 1, 2021 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn. (kcv, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Warden, USP Beaumont
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Romalis Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden, USP Beaumont
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?