Brinson v. Kansas City Southern Railway Company et al
Plaintiff: Jay Brinson
Respondent: Kansas City Southern Railway Company and Sperry Rail, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00501
Filed: October 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Marcia A Crone
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2021 Filing 8 Case transferred in from District of Texas Southern; Case Number 4:21-cv-03086. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO TRANSFER CASE to Eastern District of Texas, Beaumont; granting #4 Motion to Transfer Case. (Signed by Judge Ewing Werlein, Jr) Parties notified.(olindor, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/4/2021.]
September 29, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Class Action Petition by Sperry Rail, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 10/20/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss)(Indest, Miles) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/4/2021.]
September 29, 2021 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Conference re: #4 MOTION to Transfer Case to Eastern District of Texas by Sperry Rail, Inc., filed.(Indest, Miles) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/4/2021.]
September 24, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Transfer Case to Eastern District of Texas by Sperry Rail, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 10/15/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion to Transfer Venue)(Indest, Miles) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/4/2021.]
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 1/21/2022 at 02:15 PM in Room 11521 before Judge Ewing Werlein, Jr. (Signed by Judge Ewing Werlein, Jr) Parties notified.(RachelSalazar, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/4/2021.]
September 22, 2021 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Sperry Rail, Inc., filed.(Indest, Miles) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/4/2021.]
September 22, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County 128th Judicial District Court, case number A200964-C (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-27084714) filed by Sperry Rail, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Copies of All the State Court Documents filed to date)(Indest, Miles) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/4/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brinson v. Kansas City Southern Railway Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jay Brinson
Represented By: Brent Wayne Coon
Represented By: John R Fabry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kansas City Southern Railway Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Sperry Rail, Inc.
Represented By: Miles O Indest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?