Chase v. U.S. Bureau of Prisons
Petitioner: Benjamin Chase
Respondent: US Bureau of Prisons
Case Number: 1:2021cv00521
Filed: October 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Marcia A Crone
Referring Judge: Christine L Stetson
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2021 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of California Northern; Case Number 3:21-cv-07566. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 18, 2021 Case assigned to District Judge Marcia A. Crone. (bjc, )
October 18, 2021 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Christine L. Stetson. (bjc, )
October 18, 2021 Remark: Case file electronically transferred to the Eastern District of Texas. (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/18/2021.]
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 10/15/2021. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/18/2021.]
September 29, 2021 Filing 3 Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to Magistrate Judge (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/18/2021.]
September 29, 2021 Filing 2 CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 11/8/2021. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/18/2021.]
September 29, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Filed byBenjamin Chase. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/18/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chase v. U.S. Bureau of Prisons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Benjamin Chase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: US Bureau of Prisons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?