Bryan's Convenience & Food Store, L.L.C. al v. Wright National Flood Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Bryan's Convenience & Food Store, L.L.C. D/B/A Bryan's Food Stop, Ma-Imelda Tristan Hernandez A/K/A Ma-Imelda Hernandez, Judyth Magana, Ma-Imelda Tristan Hernandez, Bryan's Convenience & Food Store LLC doing business as Bryan's Food Stop and Ma-Imelda Hernandez
Defendant: Wright National Flood Insurance Company, Maxum Indemnity Company and Amwins Access Insurance Services, LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv00523
Filed: October 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Michael J Truncale
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER setting various deadlines. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/1/2022 09:00 AM in Ctrm 2 (Beaumont) before District Judge Michael J. Truncale. Jury Selection and Trial set for 9/12/2022 09:00 AM in Ctrm 2 (Beaumont) before District Judge Michael J. Truncale. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 11/29/2021. (bjc, )
November 29, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Michael J. Truncale: Case Management Conference held on 11/29/2021. Attorneys present: Stuart Yoes, Ryan Watson, Laura Grabouski, Jennifer Kearns. Court will enter scheduling order. (Court Reporter None.) (jmv, )
November 24, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Amwins Access Insurance Services, LLC (Kearns, Jennifer)
November 24, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Wright National Flood Insurance Company (Morgan, Joel)
November 23, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Maxum Indemnity Company (Grabouski, Laura)
November 19, 2021 Filing 14 Submission of Proposed Agreed Docket Control/Scheduling order by Amwins Access Insurance Services, LLC, Maxum Indemnity Company, Wright National Flood Insurance Company . (Grabouski, Laura)
November 19, 2021 Filing 13 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Grabouski, Laura)
November 17, 2021 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Amwins Access Insurance Services, LLC (Kearns, Jennifer)
November 9, 2021 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Bryan's Convenience & Food Store LLC (Yoes, Stuart)
November 9, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Ma-Imelda Tristan Hernandez (Yoes, Stuart)
October 25, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' state law causes of action (counts 2-7), and claims for treble damages, attorneys' fees, exemplary damages, costs, interest, pain, suffering, disability, loss of earning capacity and emotional distress by Wright National Flood Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Bradley)
October 25, 2021 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Wright National Flood Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Brown & Brown, Inc for Wright National Flood Insurance Company. (Jones, Bradley)
October 25, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Wright National Flood Insurance Company. (Jones, Bradley)
October 21, 2021 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Maxum Indemnity Company identifying Corporate Parent The Hartford Financial Services Group Inc, Corporate Parent Hartford for Maxum Indemnity Company. (Grabouski, Laura)
October 21, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE by Maxum Indemnity Company re #1 Notice of Removal, Joinder (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Answer, Jefferson Co, TX)(Grabouski, Laura)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDERED that Rule 26(f) attorney conference must occur by 11/9/2021. Rule 16 Case Management/Scheduling Conference set for 11/29/2021 10:30 AM in Room 221 (Beaumont) before District Judge Michael J. Truncale. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 10/20/2021. (bjc, )
October 19, 2021 Filing 3 ***ORIGINALLY FILED IN STATE COURT AND IS INCLUDED IN THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL.*** ANSWER to #2 Petition by Amwins Access Insurance Services, LLC.(bjc, )
October 19, 2021 Filing 2 ***ORIGIANLLY FILED IN STATE COURT AND IS INCLUDED IN THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL.*** PETITION against All Defendants.(bjc, )
October 19, 2021 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Bryan's Convenience & Food Store LLC, Ma-Imelda Tristan Hernandez, Judyth Magana. (bjc, )
October 19, 2021 Case assigned to District Judge Michael J. Truncale. (bjc, )
October 19, 2021 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (bjc, )
October 18, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wright National Flood Insurance Company from 58th Judicial District Court, Jefferson County, Texas, case number A-0208316. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8630076), filed by Wright National Flood Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A, #2 Ex. B, #3 Ex. C, #4 Ex. D, #5 Ex. E, #6 Ex. F)(Jones, Bradley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bryan's Convenience & Food Store, L.L.C. al v. Wright National Flood Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan's Convenience & Food Store, L.L.C. D/B/A Bryan's Food Stop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ma-Imelda Tristan Hernandez A/K/A Ma-Imelda Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judyth Magana
Represented By: Stuart Cooper Yoes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ma-Imelda Tristan Hernandez
Represented By: Stuart Cooper Yoes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan's Convenience & Food Store LLC doing business as Bryan's Food Stop
Represented By: Stuart Cooper Yoes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ma-Imelda Hernandez
Represented By: Stuart Cooper Yoes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wright National Flood Insurance Company
Represented By: Bradley K Jones
Represented By: Alexander Spotswood de Witt
Represented By: Douglas David D'Arche
Represented By: Joel Wayne Morgan
Represented By: Ryan Anderson Walton
Represented By: Theodore Ira Brenner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maxum Indemnity Company
Represented By: Laura J Grabouski
Represented By: Steven Ernest Holden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amwins Access Insurance Services, LLC
Represented By: Jennifer M Kearns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?