Hunter et al v. Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Demetris Hunter and Lisa Hunter
Defendant: Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2021cv00561
Filed: November 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Michael J Truncale
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER setting various deadlines. Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/3/2022 09:00 AM in Ctrm 2 (Beaumont) before District Judge Michael J. Truncale. Jury Selection and Trial set for 11/7/2022 09:00 AM in Ctrm 2 (Beaumont) before District Judge Michael J. Truncale. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 1/4/2022. (bjc, )
January 4, 2022 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Michael J. Truncale: Case Management Conference held on 1/4/2022. Attorneys present: Brandon Schilter, Wesley Ward. Court will enter scheduling order. (Court Reporter None.) (jmv, )
December 1, 2021 Filing 6 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order proposed Scheduling Order)(Ward, Wesley)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDERED that a Rule 26(f) Attorney Conference must occur by December 6, 2021. Rule 26 Case Management/Scheduling Conference set for 1/4/2022 11:00 AM in Room 221 (Beaumont) before District Judge Michael J. Truncale. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 11/15/2021. (bjc, )
November 12, 2021 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Demetris Hunter, Lisa Hunter. (bjc, )
November 12, 2021 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (bjc, )
November 12, 2021 Case assigned to District Judge Michael J. Truncale. (bjc, )
November 11, 2021 Filing 4 ***ORIGINALLY FILED IN STATE COURT AND IS INCLUDED IN THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL.*** ANSWER to #3 PETITION by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company.(bjc, )
November 11, 2021 Filing 3 ***ORIGINALLY FILED IN STATE COURT AND IS INCLUDED IN THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL.*** PETITION against Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company.(bjc, )
November 11, 2021 Filing 2 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company. (Ward, Wesley)
November 11, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company from 260th District Court of Orange County, Texas, case number 210456-C. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8667593), filed by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Index of matters being filed, #2 Exhibit B- Case Summary in the state court action, #3 Exhibit C- Plaintiffs Original Petition, #4 Exhibit D- Issued Citation for Allstate, #5 Exhibit E- Allstates Original Answer, #6 Exhibit F- Counsel of Record, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ward, Wesley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hunter et al v. Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Demetris Hunter
Represented By: George Brandon Schilter
Represented By: James Marshall McClenny
Represented By: John Zachary Moseley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Hunter
Represented By: George Brandon Schilter
Represented By: James Marshall McClenny
Represented By: John Zachary Moseley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company
Represented By: Wesley R Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?