Stedman Ventures, Inc. v. Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, et al
Plaintiff: Stedman Ventures, Inc.
Defendant: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing Severally to Certificate No. AMR-3789-05, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, QBE Specialty Insurance Company, Steadfast Insurance Company, General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona, United Specialty Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, International Insurance Company of Hannover, Old Republic Union Insurance Company, CJW and Associates and Princeton Excess and Surplus Lines Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2021cv00574
Filed: November 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Michael J Truncale
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/9/2023 09:00 AM in Ctrm 2 (Beaumont) before District Judge Michael J. Truncale. Jury Selection/Trial set for 2/13/2023 09:00 AM in Ctrm 2 (Beaumont) before District Judge Michael J. Truncale. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 1/7/22. (tkd, )
January 6, 2022 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Michael J. Truncale: Case Management Conference held on 1/6/2022. Attorneys Present: Christopher Schleiffer, Carter Ferguson, and Bruce R. Wilkin. Court will enter Scheduling Order (Court Reporter None.) (jmv, )
December 27, 2021 Filing 11 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Ferguson, Carter)
December 23, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE by Stedman Ventures, Inc. of Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures (Schleiffer, Christopher)
December 22, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE by CJW and Associates Certificate of Interested Parties (Wilkin, Bruce)
December 22, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE by CJW and Associates Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures (Wilkin, Bruce)
December 22, 2021 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London (Ferguson, Carter)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER directing the parties to conduct a Rule 26(f) attorney conference by 12/13/2021. Rule 16 Case Management/Scheduling Conference set for 1/5/2022 at 2:00 PM in Beaumont Courthouse before District Judge Michael J. Truncale. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 11/22/21. (tkd, )
November 22, 2021 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (tkd, )
November 22, 2021 Case assigned to District Judge Michael J. Truncale. (tkd, )
November 19, 2021 Filing 5 ORIGINAL ANSWER (filed in state court) to #3 Original Petition, filed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, International Insurance Company of Hannover, Lexington Insurance Company, Old Republic Union Insurance Company, QBE Specialty Insurance Company, Steadfast Insurance Company, United Specialty Insurance Company.(tkd, )
November 19, 2021 Filing 4 ORIGINAL ANSWER (filed in state court) to #3 Original Petition, filed by CJW and Associates.(tkd, )
November 19, 2021 Filing 3 ORIGINAL PETITION (filed in state court) against All Defendants, filed by Stedman Ventures, Inc..(tkd, )
November 19, 2021 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Stedman Ventures Inc, CJW and Associates (tkd, ) Modified on 11/22/2021 (tkd, ).
November 19, 2021 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Notice to Adverse Parties of Removal served on Stedman Ventures on 11/19/21, filed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing Severally to Certificate No. AMR-3789-05. (Ferguson, Carter)
November 19, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing Severally to Certificate No. AMR-3789-05 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8680593), filed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing Severally to Certificate No. AMR-3789-05. (Attachments: #1 Appendix in Support, #2 Exhibit)(Ferguson, Carter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stedman Ventures, Inc. v. Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stedman Ventures, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Michael Schleiffer
Represented By: Daniel Patrick Barton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing Severally to Certificate No. AMR-3789-05
Represented By: Carter Len Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London
Represented By: Jerrod L Rinehart
Represented By: Carter Len Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indian Harbor Insurance Company
Represented By: Carter Len Ferguson
Represented By: Jerrod L Rinehart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QBE Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Carter Len Ferguson
Represented By: Jerrod L Rinehart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steadfast Insurance Company
Represented By: Carter Len Ferguson
Represented By: Jerrod L Rinehart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona
Represented By: Carter Len Ferguson
Represented By: Jerrod L Rinehart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Carter Len Ferguson
Represented By: Jerrod L Rinehart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lexington Insurance Company
Represented By: Carter Len Ferguson
Represented By: Jerrod L Rinehart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Insurance Company of Hannover
Represented By: Carter Len Ferguson
Represented By: Jerrod L Rinehart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Old Republic Union Insurance Company
Represented By: Carter Len Ferguson
Represented By: Jerrod L Rinehart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CJW and Associates
Represented By: Bruce R Wilkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Princeton Excess and Surplus Lines Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?