Straney v. Sawyer et al
Plaintiff: Christopher Straney
Defendant: Kathleen H Sawyer, Deborah G Schult and John and Jane Does
Case Number: 1:2022cv00001
Filed: January 3, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Zack Hawthorn
Referring Judge: Michael J Truncale
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2022 Filing 9 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Christopher Straney on 2/9/2022 re #8 Order for Initial Partial Filing Fee. (bjc, )
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER for Initial Partial Filing Fee of $34.50 within 30 days for Christopher Straney. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 2/4/2022. (bjc, )
February 1, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION requesting alternative service by Christopher Straney. (Attachments: #1 Sealed Medical Records)(bjc, )
January 25, 2022 Filing 6 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Christopher Straney on 1/14/2022 re #5 Order. (bjc, )
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PRELIMINARY FILING FEE ORDER that Plaintiff shall, within twenty days from the date set forth below, submit either the $402.00 filing fee or an application to proceed in forma pauperis and a statement certified by an authorized prison official showing the average balance in, and deposits into, Plaintiff's inmate trust account for the preceding six months. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 1/7/2022. (bjc, )
January 7, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Christopher Straney. (bjc, )
January 7, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Christopher Straney. (bjc, )
January 3, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Christopher Straney. (bjc, )
January 3, 2022 Filing 1 28:1331 BIVENS COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Christopher Straney.(bjc, )
January 3, 2022 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn. (bjc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Straney v. Sawyer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Straney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen H Sawyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah G Schult
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?