Kemp Properties, LLC #1 v. Great Lakes Insurance SE et al
Plaintiff: Kemp Properties, LLC #1
Defendant: Great Lakes Insurance SE, Alacrity Solutions Group, LLC and Diana Blackwell
Case Number: 1:2022cv00079
Filed: February 25, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Marcia A Crone
Referring Judge: Zack Hawthorn
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2022 Filing 17 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Great Lakes Insurance SE, filed by Kemp Properties, LLC #1.(Canady, James) Modified title on 4/22/2022 (kcv, ).
April 21, 2022 ***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 15, REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting was filed in error per attorney and has already been re-filed as document #16. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (kcv, )
April 21, 2022 Filing 16 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Scheduling Order (Corrected))(Kauffman, James)
April 21, 2022 Filing 15 ***FILED IN ERROR. Please ignore.***REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Scheduling Order)(Kauffman, James) Modified on 4/22/2022 (kcv, ).
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting the #12 Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint, and denying as moot the #9 Motion to Dismiss subject to reassertion once Kemp Properties files its Second Amended Complaint. Kemp Properties has ten (10) days from the date of this order to file its Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 4/14/22. (kcv, )
April 6, 2022 Filing 13 RESPONSE to Motion re #12 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint filed by Great Lakes Insurance SE. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Srubar, Brian)
March 31, 2022 ***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 10, MOTION for Leave to File was filed in error with no attached order. Counsel has re-filed as doc #12. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (kcv, )
March 31, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to File by Kemp Properties, LLC #1. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Canady, James) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/1/2022: #2 Revised Proposed Order) (kcv, ).
March 31, 2022 Filing 11 ***FILED IN ERROR. This is not a motion. Please ignore.*** MOTION for Leave to File by Kemp Properties, LLC #1. (Canady, James) Modified on 3/31/2022 (kcv, ).
March 31, 2022 Filing 10 ***FILED IN ERROR. Please ignore.***MOTION for Leave to File by Kemp Properties, LLC #1. (Canady, James) Modified on 4/1/2022 (kcv, ).
March 31, 2022 ***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 11, MOTION for Leave to File does not contain a motion it is an incorrectly filed proposed order. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (kcv, )
March 30, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss by Great Lakes Insurance SE. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Srubar, Brian)
March 16, 2022 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Great Lakes Insurance SE, filed by Kemp Properties, LLC #1.(Canady, James)
March 16, 2022 Filing 7 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE.*** AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Kemp Properties, LLC #1.(Canady, James) Modified on 3/16/2022 (bjc, ).
March 16, 2022 ***FILED IN ERROR per attorney. Document # 7, amended complaint. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (bjc, )
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER directing the parties to conduct a Rule 26(f) Attorney Conference by Thursday, April 7, 2022. Rule 16 Case Management/Scheduling Conference set for 5/23/2022 at 10:30 AM in Ctrm 6 (Beaumont) before Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 3/8/22. (kcv, )
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn to conduct all pretrial proceedings, to enter findings of fact and recommend disposition on case-dispositive matters, and to determine non-dispositive matters. Signed by District Judge Marcia A. Crone on 3/7/22. (kcv, )
March 4, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by James Carlos Canady on behalf of Kemp Properties, LLC #1. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8815639. (Canady, James)
February 25, 2022 Filing 3 ORIGINAL ANSWER filed in State Court and included in the Notice of Removal to #2 Original Petition by Great Lakes Insurance SE.(kcv, )
February 25, 2022 Filing 2 ORIGINAL PETITION filed in State Court and included in the Notice of Removal against Alacrity Solutions Group, LLC, Diana Blackwell, Great Lakes Insurance SE, filed by Kemp Properties, LLC #1.(kcv, )
February 25, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Great Lakes Insurance SE from 60th Jefferson County District Court, case number B-0208598. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8804166), filed by Great Lakes Insurance SE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet A-1, #2 Exhibit A-2, #3 Exhibit A-3, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E)(Kauffman, James)
February 25, 2022 Case Assigned to District Judge Marcia A. Crone. (kcv, )
February 25, 2022 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Defendant Great Lakes Insurance SE. (kcv, )
February 25, 2022 Attorney Canady was contacted via email regarding admission requirements to The Eastern District of Texas. (kcv, )
February 25, 2022 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (kcv, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kemp Properties, LLC #1 v. Great Lakes Insurance SE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kemp Properties, LLC #1
Represented By: James Carlos Canady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great Lakes Insurance SE
Represented By: James B Kauffman
Represented By: Leslie Dean Pickett
Represented By: Brian Alexander Srubar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alacrity Solutions Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diana Blackwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?