B&L Environmental v. The Travelers Lloyds Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: B&L Environmental
Defendant: The Travelers Lloyds Insurance Company, Dishon Insurance Agency and Tracey Beaudoin
Case Number: 1:2022cv00083
Filed: February 28, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Michael J Truncale
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 28, 2022 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint by Dishon Insurance Agency.(Ferguson, Paul)
April 27, 2022 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Michael J. Truncale: Case Management Conference held on 4/27/2022. Attorneys present: Greg Wilkins, Siara Dodds, Rodney Townsend, Carlos Canady. Court will enter scheduling order. (Court Reporter None.) (jmv, )
April 25, 2022 NOTICE of Hearing:Scheduling Conference RESET for 4/27/2022 at 01:00 PM before District Judge Michael J. Truncale in Room 221, Jack Brooks Federal Courthouse, 300 Willow Street, Beaumont, Texas. (kam)
April 22, 2022 NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference RESET for 4/27/2022 10:00 AM in Chambers before District Judge Michael J. Truncale. (jmv, )
April 18, 2022 Filing 15 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #9 MOTION to Remand filed by The Travelers Lloyds Insurance Company. (Wilkins, Greg)
April 18, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by James Carlos Canady on behalf of B&L Environmental. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8878648. (Canady, James)
April 18, 2022 Filing 13 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - proposed agreed scheduling order)(Wilkins, Greg)
April 11, 2022 Filing 12 REPLY to Response to Motion re #9 MOTION to Remand filed by B&L Environmental. (Voyles, Adam)
April 7, 2022 Filing 11 SUMMONS issued and emailed to plaintiff's attorney for service as to Dishon Insurance Agency. (bjc, )
April 5, 2022 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Remand filed by The Travelers Lloyds Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order denying plaintiff's motion for remand)(Wilkins, Greg)
March 23, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION to Remand by B&L Environmental. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Voyles, Adam)
March 22, 2022 ***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 8, motion to remand. No certificate of conference. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (bjc, )
March 21, 2022 Filing 8 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE.*** MOTION to Remand by B&L Environmental. (Voyles, Adam) Modified on 3/22/2022 (bjc, ).
March 21, 2022 Filing 7 AMENDED ANSWER to Plaintiff's Original Petition by The Travelers Lloyds Insurance Company. (Wilkins, Greg)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDERED that Rule 26(f) attorney conference must occur by April 5, 2022. Rule 16 Case Management/Scheduling Conference set for 4/25/2022 10:30 AM in Room 221 (Beaumont) before District Judge Michael J. Truncale. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 3/16/2022. (bjc, )
February 28, 2022 Filing 5 ***ORIGINALLY FILED IN STATE COURT AND IS INCLUDED IN THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL.*** ANSWER to #4 Amended Petition by The Travelers Lloyds Insurance Company.(bjc, )
February 28, 2022 Filing 4 ***ORIGINALLY FILED IN STATE COURT AND IS INCLUDED IN THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL.*** AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION against Tracey Beaudoin, Dishon Insurance Agency, The Travelers Lloyds Insurance Company.(bjc, )
February 28, 2022 Filing 3 ***ORIGINALLY FILED IN STATE COURT AND IS INCLUDED IN THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL.*** PETITION against Tracey Beaudoin, The Travelers Lloyds Insurance Company.(bjc, )
February 28, 2022 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by The Travelers Lloyds Insurance Company (Wilkins, Greg)
February 28, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The Travelers Lloyds Insurance Company from 128th Judicial District Court of Orange County, Texas, case number 210541-C. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8806829), filed by The Travelers Lloyds Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit B - state court docket sheet, #3 Exhibit C - copies of pleadings, answers, and processes, #4 Exhibit D - list of parties, #5 Exhibit E - list of attorneys, #6 Exhibit F - record of parties who have requested jury trial, #7 Exhibit G - court name and address from which case is being removed, #8 Exhibit H - statement regarding case status)(Wilkins, Greg)
February 28, 2022 Case assigned to District Judge Michael J. Truncale. (bjc, )
February 28, 2022 The following attorney was contacted by email on 2/28/2022 regarding admission requirements to the Eastern District of TX: Attorney James Carlos Canady for plaintiff B&L Environmental. (bjc, )
February 28, 2022 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (bjc, )
February 28, 2022 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by B&L Environmental, The Travelers Lloyds Insurance Company. (bjc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: B&L Environmental v. The Travelers Lloyds Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: B&L Environmental
Represented By: Adam Q Voyles
Represented By: Adam Quentin Voyles
Represented By: James Carlos Canady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Travelers Lloyds Insurance Company
Represented By: Greg Christopher Wilkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dishon Insurance Agency
Represented By: Paul Franklin Ferguson, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracey Beaudoin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?