Coleman et al v. Southwest Stage Funding, LLC dba Cascade Financial Services
Plaintiff: George Coleman and Jennifer Coleman
Defendant: Southwest State Funding, LLC dba Cascade Financial Services and Southwest Stage Funding, LLC doing business as Cascade Financial Services
Case Number: 1:2023cv00080
Filed: February 23, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Michael J Truncale
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1444 Petition for Removal- Foreclosure
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDERED that Rule 26(f) Attorney conference on or before April 28, 2023. Rule 16 Case Management/Scheduling Conference set for 5/22/2023 10:00 AM in Room 221 (Beaumont) before District Judge Michael J. Truncale. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 4/10/2023. (bjc, )
April 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response. The Court notes that Plaintiffs have filed their response [dkt.10] and same is hereby accepted and made a part of the record of this matter. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 4/10/2023. (bjc, )
April 10, 2023 Filing 14 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) filed by Southwest Stage Funding, LLC. (Smith, Jonathan)
April 10, 2023 Filing 13 RESPONSE to #8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by Southwest Stage Funding, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Jonathan) Modified on 4/10/2023 (bjc, ).
April 4, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Rob Hughes on behalf of George Coleman, Jennifer Coleman. Filing fee $ 100, receipt ATXEDC-9434020. (nkl, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/4/2023: #1 Sealed Attachment) (nkl, ).
April 4, 2023 ***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 9 motion for extension of time and #11 Response to motion. duplicate documents. See Doc# 8 and # 10. *** (bjc, )
April 3, 2023 Filing 11 ***FILED IN ERROR. DUPLICATE. PLEASE SEE Doc# 10.*** RESPONSE to Motion re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6), #9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply , #8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by George Coleman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Hughes, Rob) Modified on 4/4/2023 (bjc, ).
April 3, 2023 Filing 10 RESPONSE to #7 MOTION to Dismiss Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) filed by Jennifer Coleman, George Coleman . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Hughes, Rob) M
April 3, 2023 Filing 9 ***FILED IN ERROR. DUPLICATE. SEE DOC# 8.*** MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Jennifer Coleman. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hughes, Rob) Modified on 4/4/2023 (bjc, ).
April 3, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Motion to dismiss by George Coleman, Jennifer Coleman. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hughes, Rob) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/5/2023: #2 Revised Proposed Order) (bjc, ).
March 10, 2023 The following attorney was contacted by email on 3/10/2023 regarding admission requirements for the Eastern District of TX: Rob Hughes, Jr. for Plaintiffs, George and Jennifer Coleman (bjc, )
February 27, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) by Southwest Stage Funding, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Jonathan)
February 27, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE by Southwest Stage Funding, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal,, Additional Required Document for Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Smith, Jonathan)
February 27, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE by Southwest Stage Funding, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal,, Additional Required Documents for Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Smith, Jonathan)
February 27, 2023 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (kcv, )
February 24, 2023 The following attorney was contacted by email on 2/24/23 regarding admission requirements for the Eastern District of TX: Rob Hughes, Jr. for Plaintiffs, George and Jennifer Coleman. (kcv, )
February 23, 2023 Filing 6 ORIGINAL ANSWER filed in State Court and included in the Notice of Removal to #5 Original Petition by Southwest Stage Funding, LLC.(kcv, )
February 23, 2023 Filing 5 ORIGINAL PETITION and Request for Restraining Order filed in State Court and included in the Notice of Removal against Southwest Stage Funding, LLC, filed by George Coleman, Jennifer Coleman.(kcv, )
February 23, 2023 Case Assigned to District Judge Michael J. Truncale. (kcv, )
February 23, 2023 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT and Certificate of Interested Persons filed by Southwest State Funding, LLC dba Cascade Financial Services (Smith, Jonathan) Modified title on 2/24/2023 (kcv, ).
February 23, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Southwest State Funding, LLC dba Cascade Financial Services from 1st District Court of Jasper County, Texas, case number 40516. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXEDC-9370045), filed by Southwest State Funding, LLC dba Cascade Financial Services. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Smith, Jonathan) (Attachment 6 replaced on 2/24/2023) (kcv, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/24/2023: #8 Revised Civil Cover Sheet) (kcv, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coleman et al v. Southwest Stage Funding, LLC dba Cascade Financial Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Coleman
Represented By: Rob Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Coleman
Represented By: Rob Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southwest State Funding, LLC dba Cascade Financial Services
Represented By: Jonathan Caleb Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southwest Stage Funding, LLC doing business as Cascade Financial Services
Represented By: Jonathan Caleb Smith
Represented By: Michael John Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?