Millsaps v. Continental Casualty Company et al
Plaintiff: Brandon Millsaps
Defendant: Continental Casualty Company, Shannon Nester and Stuart Shannon Nester
Case Number: 1:2023cv00147
Filed: April 12, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Michael J Truncale
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2023 Filing 21 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #10 Opposed MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Continental Casualty Company, Shannon Nester. (Timmins, David)
June 2, 2023 Filing 20 REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 Opposed MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Brandon Millsaps. (Leger, Jane)
May 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SCHEDULING ORDER setting various deadlines. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/30/2024 at 09:00 AM in Ctrm 2 (Beaumont) before District Judge Michael J. Truncale. Jury Selection and Trial set for 6/3/2024 at 09:00 AM in Ctrm 2 (Beaumont) before District Judge Michael J. Truncale. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 5/31/23. (kcv, )
May 31, 2023 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Michael J. Truncale: Case Management Conference held on 5/31/2023. Court will enter scheduling order. Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff - Greg Dykeman, Mark Sparks; Defense - David Timmins, Scott Davis. (Court Reporter Not Recorded.) (jmv, )
May 30, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Scott L Davis on behalf of Continental Casualty Company, Shannon Nester (Davis, Scott)
May 26, 2023 ***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 16, 17, NOTICE of Attorney Appearance, and Proposed Order are filed in error. The appearing attorney did not properly file their own appearance and this court does not accept proposed orders filed as a stand-alone document. Per Local Rules the attorney that is logged in to electronically file and the signing attorney should be the same, and proposed orders are to be an attachment to the main document. Counsel has been notified. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (kcv, )
May 26, 2023 Filing 17 ***FILED IN ERROR. Please ignore.***Proposed Pretrial Order Order Denying Plaintiff's Motion to Remand by Continental Casualty Company, Shannon Nester. (Timmins, David) Modified on 5/30/2023 (kcv, ).
May 26, 2023 Filing 16 ***FILED IN ERROR. Please ignore.***NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David Howard Timmins on behalf of Continental Casualty Company, Shannon Nester (Timmins, David) Modified on 5/30/2023 (kcv, ).
May 26, 2023 Filing 15 RESPONSE to Motion re #10 Opposed MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Continental Casualty Company, Shannon Nester. (Timmins, David) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/31/2023: #1 Proposed Order) (kcv, ).
May 26, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Greg M Dykeman on behalf of Brandon Millsaps (Dykeman, Greg)
May 22, 2023 Filing 13 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Proposed Scheduling Order)(Leger, Jane)
May 18, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Continental Casualty Company, Shannon Nester (Timmins, David)
May 18, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Brandon Millsaps Third Supplemental Disclosures (Leger, Jane) Modified title on 5/19/2023 (kcv, ).
May 12, 2023 Filing 10 Opposed MOTION to Remand to State Court by Brandon Millsaps. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Leger, Jane) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/15/2023: #2 Revised Proposed Order) (tkd, ).
April 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER directing the parties to conduct a Rule 26(f) Attorney Conference on or before May 8, 2023. Rule 16 Case Management Conference set for 5/31/2023 at 11:00 AM in Room 221 before District Judge Michael J. Truncale. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 4/19/23. (kcv, )
April 19, 2023 Filing 7 Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(1) Disclosure Statement filed by Continental Casualty Company, Shannon Nester identifying Corporate Parent The Continental Corporation for Continental Casualty Company. (Timmins, David)
April 19, 2023 Filing 6 Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(2) Disclosure Statement identifying party citizenship filed by Shannon Nester . (Timmins, David) Modified title on 4/19/2023 (kcv, ).
April 13, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Supplement to #1 Notice of Removal (Stephens, Benjamin) Modified title on 4/13/2023 (kcv, ).
April 13, 2023 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (kcv, )
April 12, 2023 Filing 5 ORIGINAL ANSWER to #3 Original Petition filed in State Court and included in the Notice of Removal by Continental Casualty Company.(kcv, )
April 12, 2023 Filing 4 ORIGINAL ANSWER to #3 Original Petition filed in State Court and included in the Notice of Removal by Shannon Nester.(kcv, )
April 12, 2023 Filing 3 ORIGINAL PETITION filed in State Court and included in the Notice of Removal against Continental Casualty Company, Shannon Nester, filed by Brandon Millsaps.(kcv, )
April 12, 2023 Case Assigned to District Judge Michael J. Truncale. (kcv, )
April 12, 2023 DEMAND for Trial by Jury. (kcv, )
April 12, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Continental Casualty Company (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXEDC-9449268), filed by Continental Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Consent to Removal, #3 Exhibit B - State Court Docket and Pleadings, #4 Exhibit C - List of Parties and Counsel of Record)(Stephens, Benjamin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Millsaps v. Continental Casualty Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Millsaps
Represented By: Jane Swearingen Leger
Represented By: Greg M Dykeman
Represented By: Jonathan Joseph Jones
Represented By: Mark Christopher Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Continental Casualty Company
Represented By: Benjamin Riley Stephens
Represented By: David Howard Timmins
Represented By: Scott L Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shannon Nester
Represented By: Benjamin Riley Stephens
Represented By: David Howard Timmins
Represented By: Scott L Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stuart Shannon Nester
Represented By: Benjamin Riley Stephens
Represented By: David Howard Timmins
Represented By: Scott L Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?