Robogistics, LLC v. Dematic Corp. et al
Plaintiff: ROBOGISTICS, LLC
Defendant: DEMATIC CORP., JAMES ULINSKI and DEAN PRIEBE
Case Number: 1:2023cv00408
Filed: November 14, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Marcia A Crone
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting the #17 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Documents. Plaintiff shall have until Tuesday, January 16, 2024, to file a reply to #12 Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand; a response to #13 Defendant Dean Priebe's Motion to Dismiss; and a response to #14 Defendant Dematic Corp.'s Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay or Dismiss this Action. Signed by District Judge Marcia A. Crone on 1/10/24. (kcv, )
January 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(2), #14 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and MOTION to Stay or MOTION to Dismiss this Action Pursuant to The Federal Arbitration Act, Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) and/or 12(b)(3), #12 Response in Opposition to Motion by Robogistics, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Cashiola, Randal)
January 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting the #15 Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to File the Parties' Joint 26(f) Report and Proposed Scheduling Order. The Parties shall file their Joint 26(f) Report on or before Wednesday, January 17, 2024. Signed by District Judge Marcia A. Crone on 1/3/24. (kcv, )
January 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 AGREED MOTION for Extension of Time to File the Parties' Joint 26(f) Report and Proposed Scheduling Order by Dematic Corp., Dean Priebe, James Ulinski. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Perry, Charles)
December 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and, MOTION to Stay or, MOTION to Dismiss this Action Pursuant to The Federal Arbitration Act, Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) and/or 12(b)(3) by Dematic Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Proposed Order)(Perry, Charles)
December 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(2) by Dean Priebe. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Proposed Order)(Perry, Charles)
December 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Remand Removed Action filed by Dematic Corp., Dean Priebe, James Ulinski. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Proposed Order)(Perry, Charles)
December 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Andrea Joan Bernard on behalf of Dematic Corp., Dean Priebe, James Ulinski. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ATXEDC-9889152. (Bernard, Andrea)
December 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION to Remand Removed Action by Robogistics, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cashiola, Randal)
December 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Responsive Pleading. Defendants shall file an answer or responsive pleading on or before Thursday, December 28, 2023. Signed by District Judge Marcia A. Crone on 12/4/23. (ljw, )
December 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(1) Disclosure Statement filed by Dematic Corp. identifying Corporate Parent KION GROUP AG for Dematic Corp.. (Perry, Charles)
December 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #3 Complaint by Dematic Corp., Dean Priebe, James Ulinski. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Perry, Charles)
December 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Clerk's LR CV-10(d) Notice of Deficiency as to #6 Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to File Answer - Applications for Extension are not accepted in this court pursuant to Standing Order MC-12. Recommended cure: A proper motion requesting extension should be filed, complete with Certificate of Conference and a Proposed Order. (kcv, )
December 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to File Answer by Dematic Corp., Dean Priebe, James Ulinski. (Perry, Charles)
November 24, 2023 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling/Case Management Conference set for 2/2/2024 at 03:30 PM in Beaumont Courthouse before District Judge Marcia A. Crone. Counsel must appear in person.(jc, )
November 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER directing the parties to conduct a Rule 26(f) Attorney Conference by December 19, 2023. In addition to a discussion of the items set forth in Rule 26(f), the parties shall attempt in good faith to agree on certain matters, including deadlines for a proposed Scheduling Order, and shall file with the court a joint written report outlining their proposals no later than January 3, 2024. Signed by District Judge Marcia A. Crone on 11/22/23. (kcv, )
November 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Supplemental Exhibit B Documents to #1 Notice of Removal,. . (Perry, Charles) Modified title on 11/15/2023 (kcv, ).
November 15, 2023 Opinion or Order The following attorneys were contacted by email on 11/15/23 regarding admission requirements for the Eastern District of TX: Robert J. Thumann andLaura Hillerich for Plaintiff. (kcv, )
November 15, 2023 Opinion or Order In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (kcv, )
November 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORIGINAL PETITION filed in State Court and included in the Notice of Removal against Dematic Corp., Dean Priebe, James Ulinski, filed by Robogistics, LLC.(kcv, )
November 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Case Assigned to District Judge Marcia A. Crone. (kcv, )
November 14, 2023 Opinion or Order DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Plaintiff. (kcv, )
November 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by DEAN PRIEBE, JAMES ULINSKI, DEMATIC CORP. from 172nd Judicial District Court of Jefferson County, case number 23DCCV1721. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXEDC-9818397), filed by DEAN PRIEBE, JAMES ULINSKI, DEMATIC CORP.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Perry, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robogistics, LLC v. Dematic Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBOGISTICS, LLC
Represented By: Michael R Ramsey
Represented By: Randal Girard Cashiola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEMATIC CORP.
Represented By: Charles Stanton Perry
Represented By: Jarett J. Dillard
Represented By: Andrea Joan Bernard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES ULINSKI
Represented By: Charles Stanton Perry
Represented By: Jarett J. Dillard
Represented By: Andrea Joan Bernard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEAN PRIEBE
Represented By: Charles Stanton Perry
Represented By: Andrea Joan Bernard
Represented By: Jarett J. Dillard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?