Calderon v. Norsworthy et al
Plaintiff: Agustin Calderon
Respondent: Christopher L. Norsworthy, Angela N. Chavelier, Hollis Wilcox, Tina Thompkins and Anquanita Trimble
Case Number: 1:2024cv00020
Filed: January 16, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Christine L Stetson
Referring Judge: Michael J Truncale
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 29, 2024 Filing 15 Corespondence to the court by Agustin Calderon. (bjc, )
February 26, 2024 Filing 14 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Agustin Calderon on 2/16/2024 re #11 Report and Recommendation. (bjc, )
February 21, 2024 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss by Agustin Calderon. (bjc, )
February 15, 2024 Filing 12 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Agustin Calderon on 1/24/2024 re #8 Order. (bjc, )
February 6, 2024 Filing 11 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. This civil rights action filed pursuant to 42 U.S.C. 1983 should be dismissed without prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A). Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine L. Stetson on 2/6/2024. (bjc, )
January 31, 2024 Filing 10 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement for Agustin Calderon. (kcv, )
January 31, 2024 Filing 9 LETTER MOTION to Dismiss by Agustin Calderon. (Received via mail from Southern District of Texas). (kcv, ) Mailed full docket sheet on 1/31/2024 (kcv, ).
January 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER. It is ordered that Plaintiff has thirty (30) days to provide the court with a certified income trust statement for the preceding six month period showing the average balance in and deposits made to Plaintiff's inmate trust account. Plaintiff is admonished that failure to comply with this order may result in dismissal for want of prosecution pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine L. Stetson on 1/17/24. (Via regular mail with ack card on 1/18/24). (kcv, )
January 16, 2024 Filing 7 Case transferred in from District of Texas Southern; Case Number 4:24-cv-00126. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
January 16, 2024 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Christine L. Stetson. (ljw, )
January 16, 2024 Interdistrict transfer to Eastern District of Texas, Beaumont Division. Case transferred electronically. Case terminated on 1/12/2024, filed. (KimberlyPicota, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 1/16/2024.]
January 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO TRANSFER CASE to Eastern District of TX, Beaumont Division.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(KimberlyPicota, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 1/16/2024.]
January 11, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (AaronJackson, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 1/16/2024.]
January 11, 2024 Filing 4 Letter from Agustin Calderon, filed. (AaronJackson, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 1/16/2024.]
January 11, 2024 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Agustin Calderon, filed. (AaronJackson, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 1/16/2024.]
January 11, 2024 Filing 2 MOTION/APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Agustin Calderon, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/1/2024. (AaronJackson, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 1/16/2024.]
January 11, 2024 Filing 1 Prisoner Civil Rights COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 405) filed by Agustin Calderon. (AaronJackson, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 1/16/2024.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Calderon v. Norsworthy et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Agustin Calderon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Christopher L. Norsworthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Angela N. Chavelier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Hollis Wilcox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Tina Thompkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Anquanita Trimble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?