Mobley, et al v. Honeywell Internatl, et al
Plaintiff: L Eugene Mobley and Peggy Mobley
Defendant: Amsted Industries Inc, Combustion Engineering Inc, Rapid-American Corporation, U S Gypsum Co, Georgia Pacific Corporation, T & N plc, General Motors Corporation, Oriental Gasket & Packing Co, . The Anchor Packing Company, A P Green Industries Inc, Railroad Friction Products Corporation, General Electric Company, The Flintkote Company, Westinghouse Air Brake Company, General Gasket Corp, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Griffin Wheel Co, Pneumo Abex Corporation, US Mineral Products Company, Rhone-Poulenc Ag Co, Uniroyal Fiber & Textile Division of Uniroyal Inc, Certainteed Corp, Quaker State Oil Refining Corporation, Arkansas Lion Oil Company, ABC-Naco Inc, Garlock Corporation, Sager Corporation, The, A W Chesterton Company, CBS Corporation and Honeywell International Inc
Case Number: 2:2001cv00275
Filed: December 26, 2001
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David Folsom
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 14, 2003. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2003 Shipped to FRC on 11/05/02 Accession number: 021-03-0050, Location 2-16-240-1-4 Box 13 of 15 (ktd) Modified on 10/29/2007 (ch, ).
October 10, 2002 Acknowledgement by Harrison County Dist Clerk of receipt on 10/9/02 of remanded cased (ktd)
October 3, 2002 Case closed (ktd)
October 3, 2002 Case reopened pursuant to #8 order (ktd)
October 3, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER, reopening case for the sole purpose of entering order of remand to Harrison County District Court , and remanding case to state district court; case lacks federal jurisdiction ( signed by Judge David Folsom 10/3/02 cc: attys & df fx/mld 10/3/02) (ktd)
June 28, 2002 Case Administratively Closed (ktd)
June 28, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER, administratively closing cases pending disposition of the appeal by the Third Circuit ( signed by Judge David Folsom 6/28/02 cc: attys & df fx/mld 6/28/02 ) (ktd)
February 8, 2002 Filing 6 Notice by Honeywell Internatl of provisional transfer order transferring case to the USDC for the District of Delaware (ktd)
January 22, 2002 Filing 5 Motion by Honeywell Internatl with memorandum in support for temporary stay (ktd)
January 7, 2002 Copy file & docket sheet mailed to Judge Folsom (ktd)
January 7, 2002 Case reassigned to Judge David Folsom (ktd)
January 7, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order of recusal. ( signed by Judge T. John Ward 1/2/02 cc: attys & tjw fx 1/7/02) (ktd)
January 4, 2002 Filing 3 Emergency Motion by L Eugene Mobley, Peggy Mobley with memorandum in support "emergency" to remand to state court , and "emergency" to abstain , and "emergency" for sanctions (ktd)
December 26, 2001 Demand for jury trial by Honeywell Internatl (ktd)
December 26, 2001 Demand for jury trial by L Eugene Mobley, Peggy Mobley (ktd)
December 26, 2001 Filing 2 Motion by Honeywell Internatl to limit documents filed with notice of removal (ktd)
December 26, 2001 Filing Fee Paid; FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 96217 (ktd)
December 26, 2001 Answer to original petition by Honeywell Internatl (ktd)
December 26, 2001 Original Complaint filed. Cause: 28:1441 Notice of Removal-Asbestos Litigation (ktd)
December 26, 2001 Magistrate consent forms mailed to L Eugene Mobley, Peggy Mobley, Honeywell Internatl . (ktd)
December 26, 2001 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Notice of Removal by defendant Honeywell Internatl from Harrison County District Court; Case Number: 01-0351, together with copies of the following papers filed in state court: 1) original petition filed 4/18/01; 2) certified copy of state court docket sheet; 3) citation for service issued to Honeywell International 4/20/01, with no return thereon; 4) Return of service on citations showing dft Honeywell served with process by cert mail on 5/1/01; 5) dft Honeywell's motion to transfer venue, original answer, cross-action and answer to all cross-action filed in state court on 5/23/01; 6) agreed protective order signed by Judge Bonnie Leggat; 7) order signed by Judge Bonnie Leggat appointing John H Waldie as process server, filed 4/24/01 (ktd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mobley, et al v. Honeywell Internatl, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amsted Industries Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Combustion Engineering Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rapid-American Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U S Gypsum Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Georgia Pacific Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T & N plc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Motors Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oriental Gasket & Packing Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: . The Anchor Packing Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A P Green Industries Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Railroad Friction Products Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Flintkote Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westinghouse Air Brake Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Gasket Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Griffin Wheel Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pneumo Abex Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Mineral Products Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhone-Poulenc Ag Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uniroyal Fiber & Textile Division of Uniroyal Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certainteed Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quaker State Oil Refining Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas Lion Oil Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC-Naco Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garlock Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sager Corporation, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A W Chesterton Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International Inc
Represented By: Joseph Stuart Pevsner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L Eugene Mobley
Represented By: Russell Clay Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peggy Mobley
Represented By: Russell Clay Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?