Compression Labs Incorporated v. Adobe Systems Incorporated et al Featured Case

Plaintiff Compression Labs, Incorporated alleged that defendants infringed on U.S. Patent No. 4,698,672 entitled "Coding System for Reducing Redundancy."

Plaintiff: Compression Labs Incorporated
Defendant: Agfa Corporation, Apple Computer Incorporated, Axis Communications Incorporated, Canon USA Incorporated, Concord Camera Corporation, Creative Labs Incorporated, Eastman Kodak Company, Fuji Photo Film USA Inc, Fujitsu Computer Products of America Inc, Gateway Incorporated, Hewlett-Packard Company, JASC Software, Inc, JVC Americas Corporation, Kyocera Wireless Corporation, Matsushita Electric Corporation of America, Mitsubishi Digital Electronics America Inc, Oce North America Incorporated, Onkyo USA Corporation, PalmOne Incorporated, Panasonic Communications Corporation of America, Panasonic Mobile Communications Development Corporation of USA, Ricoh Corporation, Riverdeep Incorporated, Savin Corporation, Thomson S A, Xerox Corporation, "defendants", Thomson Inc and CLI
Case Number: 2:2004cv00158
Filed: April 22, 2004
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Marshall Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: David Folsom
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2005 Filing 210
Interdistrict transfer to the Northern District of California, San Francisco Division. Order from the Judicial panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring this case to the the above District and assigning it to Judge Phyllis J Hamilton. Certified copy of docket entries along with a copy of the transmittal letter sent to the ND/CA (ehs)
February 10, 2005 Filing 209
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Barry K Shelton for Hewlett-Packard Company. (ch, )
February 7, 2005 Filing 208
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Amy E Pizzutillo for Hewlett-Packard Company. (ch, )
January 31, 2005 Filing 189
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge David Folsom : Motion Hearing held on 1/31/2005 re 91 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(7) or, in the Alternative, to Transfer Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) filed by Onkyo USA Corporation,, 44 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative to Transfer filed by Concord Camera Corporation,, Creative Labs Incorporated,, 45 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the alternative, Motion to Transfer filed by Xerox Corporation,, Eastman Kodak Company,, Hewlett-Packard Company,, Fujitsu Computer Products of America Inc,, Matsushita Electric Corporation of America,, JASC Software, Inc,, Mitsubishi Digital Electronics America Inc,, Fuji Photo Film USA Inc,, Ricoh Corporation,, Thomson Inc,, Agfa Corporation,, Apple Computer Incorporated,, Axis Communications Incorporated,, Canon USA Incorporated,, Gateway Incorporated,, JVC Americas Corporation,, Kyocera Wireless Corporation,, Macromedia Incorporated,, Oce North America Incorporated,, PalmOne Incorporated,, Panasonic Communications Corporation of America,, Panasonic Mobile Communications Development Corporation of USA,, Riverdeep Incorporated,, Savin Corporation,, Thomson S A,. (Court Reporter Libby Crawford.) (mrm, ) Modified on 2/1/2005 (mrm, ).
January 25, 2005 Filing 188
NOTICE by Hewlett-Packard Company Of Withdrawl of of Gray Cary Ware & Freidenrich LLP (Albritton, Eric)
January 21, 2005 Filing 187
***FILED IN ERROR. NO CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. PLEASE IGNORE.***

NOTICE by Hewlett-Packard Company Notice of Withdrawal of Gray Cary Ware & Freidenrich LLP as Outside Counsel to Defendant Hewlett-Packard Company (Albritton, Eric) Modified on 1/24/2005 (fal, ).
January 19, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 186
ORDER vacating Judge Ward's order to the extent that it proclaims to consolidate these matters and treats said order as a reassignment. FURTHER, the Court hereby RESCHEDULES the hearing set for 1/31/05 from 10:00 am to 9:30 am. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 1/19/05. (mrm, )
January 18, 2005 Filing 185
NOTICE by Compression Labs Incorporated Plaintiff CLI's Withdrawal of Apparatus Claim (Buether, Eric)
January 14, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 184
ORDER that case be consolidated with 2:04cv159, 2:04cv294 and 2:04cv410 pending before Judge Folsom . Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 1/14/05. (ehs)
January 10, 2005 Filing 182
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Keith M Sorge for JASC Software, Inc. (rml, )
January 6, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 181
ORDER resetting Hearing on Motion 91 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(7) or, in the Alternative, to Transfer Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a), 44 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative to Transfer, 45 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the alternative, Motion to Transfer: Motion Hearing set for 1/31/2005 10:00 AM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before Judge David Folsom.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on January 6, 2005. (rml, )
December 30, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 180
ORDER granting 163 Motion for Leave to File Response to Supplemental Surreply in Opposition to Dfts Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 12/30/04. (mrm, )
December 27, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 179
ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion 91 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(7) or, in the Alternative, to Transfer Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a), 44 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative to Transfer, 45 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the alternative, Motion to Transfer: Motion Hearing set for 1/10/2005 09:30 AM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before Judge David Folsom.(45 mins ea side, dfts shall use 45 mins collectively). Signed by Judge David Folsom on 12/27/04. (mrm, )
December 17, 2004 Filing 178
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Richard S Mandaro for Panasonic Communications Corporation of America; Panasonic Mobile Communications Development Corporation of USA; JVC Americas Corporation and Matsushita Electric Corporation of America. (ch, )
December 14, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 175
ORDER granting 171 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Franklin W Jones; Sidney Calvin Capshaw and Otis W Carroll terminated . Signed by Judge David Folsom on 12/14/2004. (sm, )
December 13, 2004 Filing 174
NOTICE of Hearing on Motion to Dismiss and Scheduling Order Motion Hearing set for 1/10/2005 10:00 AM in Ctrm 319 ( in Texarkana) before Judge David Folsom. (mrm, )
December 6, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 173
PROTECTIVE ORDER/STIPULATION. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 12/6/2004. (sm, )
November 18, 2004 Filing 170
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Wesley O Mueller for Agfa Corporation. (ch, )
November 9, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 168
ORDER granting 162 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Thomas John Ward for JASC Software, Inc. Attorney Franklin Albright Poff terminated . Signed by Judge David Folsom on 11/8/2004. (mrm, )
November 5, 2004 Filing 166
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric William Buether on behalf of Compression Labs Incorporated (Buether, Eric)
November 3, 2004 Filing 161
RESPONSE in Support re 158 MOTION for Protective Order Xerox Corporation's Response To Compression Labs, Inc.'s Motion for Protective Order filed by Xerox Corporation. (Hejny, Scott)
November 1, 2004 Filing 160
***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE. SEE DOC #161.***
(Unopposed) by Xerox Corporation. (Hejny, Scott) Modified on 11/3/2004 (fal, ).
October 27, 2004 Filing 159
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Margo Wolf O'Donnell for Compression Labs Incorporated. (ch, )
October 26, 2004 Filing 153
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric Miller Albritton on behalf of Hewlett-Packard Company (Albritton, Eric)
October 25, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 150
ORDER granting 144 Motion for Leave to File a Supplemental Surreply in opposition to Dfts' motion to dismiss Under FRCP 12(b)(7), or,in the alternative, motion to transfer. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 10/22/04. (mpv, )
October 21, 2004 Filing 152
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney John W Kozak for Mitsubishi Digital Electronics America Inc. (ch, )
October 13, 2004 Filing 142
TRANSCRIPT of Management Conference Proceedings held on 10/4/04 at 10:03 a.m. in Marshall; before Judge David Folsom. Court Reporter: Libby Crawford. (ch, )
October 12, 2004 Filing 147
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Joshua S Bish for Oce North America Incorporated. (ch, )
October 5, 2004 Filing 139
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Steven J Routh for Fuji Photo Film USA Inc. (ch, )
October 4, 2004 Filing 138
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge David Folsom : Status Conference held on 10/4/2004. (Court Reporter Libby Crawford.) (mrm, )
October 1, 2004 Filing 136
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Kenneth W Donnelly for Eastman Kodak Company. (sm, )
September 29, 2004 Filing 129
NOTICE of Disclosure by PalmOne Incorporated (Tyler, Marvin)
September 23, 2004 Filing 109
NOTICE of Disclosure by Fuji Photo Film USA Inc Defendant Fuji Photo Film USA, Inc.'s Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement (Gooding, William)
September 21, 2004 Filing 107
NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling/Management Conference set for 10/4/2004 11:15 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge David Folsom. (mrm, )
September 17, 2004 Filing 106
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Merlyn D Sampels for Compression Labs Incorporated. (ch, )
September 10, 2004 Filing 104
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney David A Boag, Morton Amster, Abraham Kasdan, Joseph M Casino for Panasonic Communications Corporation of America; Panasonic Mobile Communications Development Corporation of USA; JVC Americas Corporation and Matsushita Electric Corporation of America. (ch, )
September 7, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 103
ORDER OF DISMISSAL re 100 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Compression Labs Incorporated, Macromedia Incorporated dismissing claims against Macromedia in this matter WITH PREJUDICE and court retains jurisdiction to enforce the terms of 8/20/04 confidential settlement agreement. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 9/7/2004. (sm, )
August 31, 2004 Filing 100
STIPULATION of Dismissal with prej by Compression Labs Incorporated, Macromedia Incorporated. (ktd, )
August 25, 2004 Filing 98
RESPONSE in Opposition re 45 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the alternative, Motion to Transfer filed by Compression Labs Incorporated. (Roth, Carl)
August 24, 2004 Filing 99
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Brian N Anderson for Compression Labs Incorporated. (ch, )
August 23, 2004 Filing 95
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Scott C Ryan for Compression Labs Incorporated. (ch, )
August 19, 2004 Filing 94
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Barry J Bendes, Kenneth G Roberts for Onkyo USA Corporation. (ch, )
August 18, 2004 Filing 90
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Deakin T Lauer for JASC Software, Inc. (mpv, )
August 17, 2004 Filing 87
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Kyocera Wireless Corporation (Ainsworth, Jennifer)
August 13, 2004 Filing 86
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Savin Corporation (Albritton, Eric)
August 9, 2004 Filing 83
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lance Lee on behalf of Apple Computer Incorporated, Xerox Corporation (mpv, )
August 5, 2004 Filing 80
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Concord Camera Corporation (Albritton, Eric)
August 3, 2004 Filing 78
Return of Service Executed as to Onkyo USA Corporation on 8/2/2004, answer due: 8/22/2004. (ktd, )
August 2, 2004 Filing 77
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Thomson Inc (ktd, )
July 29, 2004 Filing 79
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Christopher E Chalsen, Michael M. Murray for Fujitsu Computer Products of America Inc. (ch, ) Modified on 8/4/2004 (ch, ).
July 28, 2004 Filing 76
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Panasonic Mobile Communications Development Corporation of USA (Albritton, Eric)
July 27, 2004 Filing 82
Filed in Sherman CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Oce North America Incorporated (ktd, )
July 26, 2004 Filing 72
RESPONSE in Opposition to 44 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative to Transfer filed by Concord Camera Corporation, Creative Labs Incorporated. (djh, )
July 21, 2004 Filing 63
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Macromedia Incorporated (ktd, )
July 20, 2004 Filing 62
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Hewlett (sm, ) Modified on 7/13/2005 (sm, ).
July 16, 2004 Filing 53
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Canon USA Incorporated Replaces document No. 52 which was filed in error (Baldwin, John 'Jack')
July 12, 2004 Filing 54
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Daniel Richard Brownstone for Macromedia Incorporated. (ch, )
July 9, 2004 Filing 51
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Stuart Lubitz for Kyocera Wireless Corporation. (ch, )
July 6, 2004 Filing 47
Filed in Texarkana CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Apple Computer Incorporated (ktd, )
July 2, 2004 Filing 57
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Sean C Cunningham for Hewlett-Packard Company. (mll, )
July 1, 2004 Filing 41
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 37 First Amended Complaint by Thomson Inc. (ktd, )
June 24, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 39
ORDER OF DISMISSAL granting 36 Motion to Dismiss Adobe Systems. ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that all claims or causes of action asserted in this suit by Pla, against Dft Adobe Systems, are hereby dismissed with prejudice to the right of the parties to assert in the future any such claims. It is further ORDERED that all attys fees and costs are to be borne by the party who incurred them. . Signed by Judge David Folsom on 6/24/04. (mpv, ) Modified on 6/28/2004 (mpv, ).
June 23, 2004 Filing 40
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Heather N Mewes for Macromedia Incorporated, Charlene M Morrow for Macromedia Incorporated, Chien-Ju Alice Chen for Macromedia Incorporated, Darryl M Woo for Macromedia Incorporated, Michael J Sacksteder for Macromedia Incorporated. (ch, )
June 21, 2004 Filing 38
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Neil J McNabnay on behalf of Adobe Systems Incorporated (ktd, )
June 17, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 34
ORDER granting 33 Motion/stipulation for Panasonic Corp to answer . Signed by Judge David Folsom on 6/17/2004. (sm, )
June 16, 2004 Filing 35
NOTICE of Change of Address by Clyde Moody Siebman atty for OCE North America Inc (djh, )
June 9, 2004 Filing 33
JOINT MOTION for entry of agreed stipulation to answer on or before 7/6/04 re 1 Complaint by Compression Labs Incorporated, Panasonic Communications Corporation of America, Panasonic Mobile Communications Development Corporation of USA (ktd, )
June 2, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 31
ORDER granting 28 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; deadline is extended up to and including 7/6/04 . Signed by Judge David Folsom on 5/31/04. (ktd, )
June 1, 2004 Filing 203
Summons Returned Unexecuted by Compression Labs Incorporated as to Onkyo USA Corporation. (ch, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 2/4/2005 (ehs, ).
May 25, 2004 Filing 28
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint by Macromedia Incorporated. (ktd, )
May 24, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 24
ORDER granting 17 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to plaintiff's complaint; deadline extended to 7/6/04 . Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 5/19/04. (ktd, )
May 21, 2004 Filing 22
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daniel V Flatten on behalf of Compression Labs Incorporated (ch, )
May 20, 2004 Filing 26
FILED IN TEXARKANA MOTION for entry of agreed stipulation between the parties for dft Axis to file an answer or otherwise plead re 1 Complaint by Axis Communications Incorporated, Compression Labs Incorporated. (ktd, )
May 14, 2004 Filing 16
JOINT MOTION for entry of Agreed Stipulation extending the date for the named defendants to answer or otherwise plead to and thru 7/6/04 by "defendants", Compression Labs Incorporated. (ktd, )
May 13, 2004 Filing 17
Filed in Sherman Unconsented MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to the complaint of pla by Oce North America Incorporated. (ktd, )
May 11, 2004 Filing 14
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Gary E Hood for Compression Labs Incorporated, Cynthia K Thompson for Compression Labs Incorporated, R David Donoghue for Compression Labs Incorporated. (ch, )
May 10, 2004 Filing 12
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sidney Calvin Capshaw III on behalf of Compression Labs Incorporated (ktd, )
May 6, 2004 Filing 9
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Herschel Tracy Crawford on behalf of Apple Computer Incorporated (poa, )
May 3, 2004 Filing 11
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jack Wesley Hill, Otis W Carroll Jr on behalf of Compression Labs Incorporated (ktd, )
April 30, 2004 Filing 195
Returns of Service by cert mail Executed as to Agfa Corporation on 4/28/2004, answer due: 5/18/2004; Matsushita Electric Corporation of America on 4/28/2004, answer due: 5/18/2004; Mitsubishi Digital Electronics America Inc on 4/28/2004, answer due: 5/18/2004; Oce North America Incorporated on 4/28/2004, answer due: 5/18/2004; Ricoh Corporation on 4/28/2004, answer due: 5/18/2004; Savin Corporation on 4/28/2004, answer due: 5/18/2004. (ktd, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 2/4/2005 (ehs, ).
April 22, 2004 Filing 7
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Justin D Swindells for Compression Labs Incorporated. (mpv, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Compression Labs Incorporated v. Adobe Systems Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Compression Labs Incorporated
Represented By: Michael Charles Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Agfa Corporation
Represented By: Robert T Wittmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Computer Incorporated
Represented By: Mark C Scarsi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Axis Communications Incorporated
Represented By: Elizabeth A Niemeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Canon USA Incorporated
Represented By: Jack Baldwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Concord Camera Corporation
Represented By: Eric M. Albritton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Creative Labs Incorporated
Represented By: Eric M. Albritton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eastman Kodak Company
Represented By: Robert William Schroeder, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fuji Photo Film USA Inc
Represented By: Steven J Routh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fujitsu Computer Products of America Inc
Represented By: Michael M Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gateway Incorporated
Represented By: Justin Kurt Truelove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hewlett-Packard Company
Represented By: Bruce H Watrous, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JASC Software, Inc
Represented By: Thomas John Ward, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JVC Americas Corporation
Represented By: Richard S Mandaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kyocera Wireless Corporation
Represented By: Stuart Lubitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matsushita Electric Corporation of America
Represented By: Richard S Mandaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitsubishi Digital Electronics America Inc
Represented By: Melvin R Wilcox, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oce North America Incorporated
Represented By: Clyde Moody Siebman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Onkyo USA Corporation
Represented By: Scott English Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PalmOne Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Panasonic Communications Corporation of America
Represented By: Richard S Mandaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Panasonic Mobile Communications Development Corporation of USA
Represented By: Richard S Mandaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ricoh Corporation
Represented By: Eric M. Albritton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riverdeep Incorporated
Represented By: Eric M. Albritton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Savin Corporation
Represented By: Eric M. Albritton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomson S A
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xerox Corporation
Represented By: Thomas N Tarnay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: "defendants"
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomson Inc
Represented By: Andrew Paul Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?