Datatreasury Corporation v. Wells Fargo & Company et al Featured Case

Plaintiff DataTreasury Corporation alleged that Defendants infringed on U.S. Patent No. 5,910,988 and 6,032,137 for remote image capture with centralized processing and storage, 5,265,007 for a central check clearing system, 5,583,759 for expediting the deposit, transport and submission of checks into the payment system, 5,717,868 for an electronic payment interchange concentrator and 5,930,778 for expediting the clearing for financial instruments and coordinating the same with invoice processing at the point of receipt.

Plaintiff: Datatreasury Corporation
Defendant: Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America, National Association, U.S. Bancorp, U.S. Bank, National Association, Wachovia Corporation, Wachovia Bank, National Association, Suntrust Banks, Inc., Suntrust Bank, BB&T Corporation, Branch Banking and Trust Company, Bancorpsouth, Inc., Bancorp South Bank, Compass Bancshares, Inc., . Compass Bank, Cullen/Frost Bankers, Inc., The Frost National Bank, First Horizon National Corporation, First Tennessee Bank, National Association, HSBC North America Holdings Inc, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., Harris Bankcorp, Inc., Harris, N.A., National City Corporation, All Defendants, National City Bank, Zions Bancorporation, Zions First National Bank, Bank of New York Co., Inc., The Bank of New York Co, Inc., Unionbancal Corporation, Union Bank of California National Association, Bank of Tokyo-Mitsubishi UFJ, LTD, Citizens Financial Group, Inc., Comerica Incorporated, Comerica Bank & Trust, National Association, Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, First Citizens Bancshares, Inc., First Citizens Bank & Trust Company, Keycorp, Keybank National Association, Lasalle Bank Corporation, Lasalle Bank NA, M&T Bank Corporation, M&T Bank, The PNC Financial Services Group, Inc., PNC Bank, National Association, Small Value Payments Company, LLC, The Clearing House Payments Company, LLC, First Data Corporation, Telecheck Services, Inc., Remitco, LLC, Electronic Data Systems Corp., UBS Americas, Inc., The Bank of New York and Viewpointe Archive Services, LLC
Counter Defendant: Datatreasury Corporation
Counter Claimant: First Citizens Bank & Trust Company, Compass Bancshares, Inc., . Compass Bank, First Horizon National Corporation, First Tennessee Bank, National Association, The Clearing House Payments Company, LLC, First Data Corporation, Telecheck Services, Inc., Remitco, LLC, Bank of Tokyo-Mitsubishi UFJ, LTD, Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Citizens Financial Group, Inc., The PNC Financial Services Group, Inc., PNC Bank, National Association, Keycorp, Keybank National Association, Lasalle Bank Corporation, Lasalle Bank NA, Wachovia Corporation, Wachovia Bank, National Association, U.S. Bancorp, U.S. Bank, National Association, National City Corporation, National City Bank, BB&T Corporation, Branch Banking and Trust Company, M&T Bank Corporation, M&T Bank, Comerica Incorporated, Comerica Bank & Trust, National Association, Union Bank of California National Association, The Bank of New York, The Bank of New York Co, Inc., UBS Americas, Inc., Bank of America, National Association, City National Corporation, City National Bank, Bancorp South Bank and Unionbancal Corporation
Case Number: 2:2006cv00072
Filed: February 24, 2006
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Marshall Office
County: Collin
Presiding Judge: Caroline Craven
Presiding Judge: David Folsom
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 10, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2012 Filing 2510 US COURT of APPEALS FOR THE FEDERAL CIRCUIT ORDER re 2499 Notice of Appeal filed by U.S. Bank, National Association GRANTING U.S. Bank's motion to voluntarily dismiss the appeal. ISSUED AS MANDATED ON 1/5/2012(sm, )
November 10, 2011 Filing 2509 NOTICE by National City Bank Request For Termination Of Electronic Notices (Bewersdorf, Ryan)
October 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 2508 ORDER OF US COURT OF APPEALS FOR THE FEDERAL CIRCUIT ORDERING that Motion to dismiss Viewpointe and The Clearing House from 2011-1587 is Granted in Part; Motion to Withdraw 2011-1604 and 2011-1604 is Granted and 2011-1605 are Dismissed; Each side shall bear its own costs in 2011-1604 and 2011-1605. ISSUED AS MANDATED (As to 2011-1604-1604 only) on 10/7/2011(sm, )
September 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 2507 ORDER granting 2500 Motion to Stay Execution of Judgment Without a Bond on Appeal. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 9/30/11. (mrm, )
September 26, 2011 Filing 2506 USCA Case Number 2011-1605 for 2502 Notice of Cross Appeal filed by Viewpointe Archive Services, LLC. (ehs, )
September 26, 2011 Filing 2505 NOTICE from USCA for the Federal Circuit as to 2501 Notice of Appeal - PATENT CASE. Case assigned 2011-1604 (ehs, )
September 26, 2011 Filing 2504 NOTICE by Datatreasury Corporation re 2500 Opposed MOTION to Stay Judgment Without Bond on Appeal DataTreasury Corporation's Notice of Non-Opposition to U.S. Bank National Association's Motion to Stay Execution of Judgment Without Bond on Appeal (Roach, Nelson)
September 19, 2011 Filing 2503 NOTICE from USCA for the Federal Circuit Court re 2499 Notice of Appeal - PATENT CASE. Case assigned number 2011-1587 (ehs, )
September 16, 2011 Certified copies of Cross appeals # 2501 and # 2502 along with docket sheet sent to USCA for the Federal Circuit (ehs, )
September 15, 2011 Filing 2502 NOTICE OF CROSS APPEAL by Viewpointe Archive Services, LLC. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 0540-3227621. (Philbin, Phillip)
September 15, 2011 Filing 2501 NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL CROSS APPEAL - PATENT CASE as to 2497 Judgment, 2498 Judgment,,,, by The Clearing House Payments Company, LLC. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 0540-3227547. (McGee, Preston)
September 9, 2011 Filing 2500 Opposed MOTION to Stay Judgment Without Bond on Appeal by U.S. Bank, National Association. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A USBNA certificate, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Harrison, Guy)
September 2, 2011 Certified copy of NOA, Judgment, Amended Judgment and docket sheet sent to the USCA for the Federal Fircuit (ehs, )
September 1, 2011 Filing 2499 NOTICE OF APPEAL - PATENT CASE as to 2497 Judgment, 2498 Judgment,,,, by U.S. Bank, National Association. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 0540-3206030. (Keener, Jason)
August 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 2498 AMENDED FINAL JUDGMENT - judgment for Plaintiff and against Defendants U.S. Bank National Association, Viewpointe Archive Services, LLC and The Clearing House Payments Company LLC.. on the counterclaims for declaratory judgment ofnon-infringement, invalidity, and unenforceability, except as follows: In accordance with the Courts September 27, 2010 Orders (Dkt. No. 2363, 2367, and 2369). The Court also hereby SEVERS all claims and counterclaims related to the so-called Randle Patents, which are United States Patents No. 5,265,007, 5,583,759, 5,717,868, and 5,930,778. See Fourth Amended Complaint, Dkt. No. 1252. The Court hereby ORDERS that the Clerk shall assign a new cause number for these claims, shall include as parties Plaintiff DataTreasury Corporation and Defendant U.S. Bank National Association, and shall include Plaintiffs Fourth Amended Complaint (Dkt. No. 1252), U.S. Banks Amended Answer thereto (Dkt. No. 1593), Plaintiffs Answer to U.S. Banks Amended Answer (Dkt. No. 1720), and the Courts September 17, 2007 Order staying the above-captioned case as to the Randle Patents (Dkt. No. 798). The Court further hereby LIFTS the stay as the Randle Patents.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 8/2/11. (ehs, )
August 2, 2011 Filing 2497 FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 8/1/11. (mrm, )
August 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 2496 ORDER re: Rate for Post-Verdict Royalties; denying 2482 MOTION to Strike Untimely Declarations and Expert Reports Served by U.S. Bank filed by Datatreasury Corporation. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 8/1/11. (mrm, )
July 22, 2011 Filing 2495 Proposed Findings of Fact by Datatreasury Corporation. (Rupp, Karl)
July 22, 2011 Filing 2494 Proposed Findings of Fact by U.S. Bancorp, U.S. Bank, National Association. (Keener, Jason)
July 14, 2011 Filing 2493 REPLY to Response to Motion re 2486 Opposed MOTION Seeking Authorization From the Court to Disclose Information to Wells Fargo filed by Datatreasury Corporation. (Bruster, Anthony)
July 12, 2011 Filing 2492 Additional Attachments to Main Document: 2491 Sealed Response to Motion,.. (Keener, Jason)
July 11, 2011 Filing 2491 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 2486 Opposed MOTION Seeking Authorization From the Court to Disclose Information to Wells Fargo filed by U.S. Bancorp, U.S. Bank, National Association. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex. A, # 2 Exhibit Ex. B, # 3 Exhibit Ex. C, # 4 Exhibit Ex. D)(Keener, Jason)
July 6, 2011 Filing 2490 REPLY to Response to Motion re 2482 MOTION to Strike Untimely Declarations and Expert Reports Served by U.S. Bank DTC's Reply to US Bank's Response to Motion to Strike filed by Datatreasury Corporation. (Bruster, Anthony)
July 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 2489 ORDER; the Court hereby ORDERS that the parties submit proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law no later than July 22, 2011, at 5:00 P.M. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 7/1/11. (mrm, )
July 1, 2011 Filing 2488 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 2482 MOTION to Strike Untimely Declarations and Expert Reports Served by U.S. Bank filed by U.S. Bancorp, U.S. Bank, National Association. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex 1, # 2 Exhibit Ex 2, # 3 Exhibit Ex 3, # 4 Exhibit Ex 4, # 5 Exhibit Ex 5, # 6 Exhibit Ex 6)(Keener, Jason)
July 1, 2011 Filing 2487 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on June 16, 2011, Mini-Trial, before The Honorable Chief Judge David Folsom. Court Reporter: Libby Crawford, CSR, Telephone number: 903.794.4067 Ext. 237 or lcrawford@cableone.net. <P>NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov<P> Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/25/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/4/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/3/2011. (Crawford, Libby)
June 27, 2011 Filing 2486 Opposed MOTION Seeking Authorization From the Court to Disclose Information to Wells Fargo by Datatreasury Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit)(Roach, Nelson)
June 16, 2011 Filing 2485 AMENDED Minutes for proceedings held before Judge David Folsom: Evidentiary Hearing held on 6/16/2011. (Court Reporter Libby Crawford.) (rml, )
June 16, 2011 Filing 2484 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge David Folsom: Evidentiary Hearing held on 6/16/2011. (Court Reporter Libby Crawford.) (rml, )
June 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 2483 ORDER granting 2481 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages for U.S. Bank's Response Brief Regarding Post-Verdict Royalties. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 6/15/11. (mrm, )
June 14, 2011 Filing 2482 MOTION to Strike Untimely Declarations and Expert Reports Served by U.S. Bank by Datatreasury Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Roach, Nelson)
June 14, 2011 Filing 2481 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for U.S. Bank's Response Brief Regarding Post-Verdict Royalties - Dkt 2479 by U.S. Bancorp, U.S. Bank, National Association. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Keener, Jason)
June 13, 2011 Filing 2480 Sealed Document (Pla Reply Brief in support of requested rate for post verdict). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6)(Rupp, Karl) Modified on 6/14/2011 (sm, ).
June 10, 2011 Filing 2479 Sealed Document. - US Bank's Response to DataTreasury's Brief for Post-Verdict Royalties (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex A, # 2 Exhibit Ex B, # 3 Exhibit Ex C, # 4 Exhibit Ex D, # 5 Exhibit Ex E, # 6 Exhibit Ex F, # 7 Exhibit Ex G, # 8 Exhibit Ex H, # 9 Exhibit Ex I, # 10 Exhibit Ex J, # 11 Exhibit Ex K, # 12 Exhibit Ex L, # 13 Exhibit Ex M)(Keener, Jason)
June 3, 2011 Filing 2478 Sealed Document (Opening Brief in Support of Request Rate for Post Verdict Penalties) by Plaintiff. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Rupp, Karl) Modified on 6/6/2011 (sm, ).
April 6, 2011 Filing 2477 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on March 7, 2011, Status Conference before The Honorable Chief Judge David Folsom. Court Reporter: Libby Crawford, CSR, Telephone number: 903.794.4067 Ext. 237 or lcrawford@cableone.net. <P>NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov<P> Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 5/2/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/12/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/8/2011. (aec, )
March 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 2476 ORDER, ( Evidentiary Hearing set for 6/16/2011 09:00 AM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before Judge David Folsom.) Each side shall have 15 minutes for opening statement, 15 minutes for closing statement, and 2.5 hours to present and cross-examine the witnesses. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 3/25/11. (mrm, )
March 17, 2011 Filing 2475 Submission of Proposed Agreed Docket Control/Scheduling order by Datatreasury Corporation Agreed Motion to Enter Scheduling Order Regarding Post-Verdict Royalties Dispute. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bruster, Anthony)
March 7, 2011 Filing 2474 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge David Folsom: Status Conference held on 3/7/2011. (Court Reporter Libby Crawford.) (mrm, )
March 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 2473 ORDER, ( Status Conference reset for 3/7/2011 11:00 AM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before Judge David Folsom.). Signed by Judge David Folsom on 3/3/11. (mrm, )
February 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 2472 ORDER denying without prejudice 2277 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 2/23/11. (mrm, )
February 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 2471 ORDER granting 2417 Motion to Dismiss with prejudice Dft SunTrust Banks, Inc. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 2/16/2011. (sm, )
February 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 2470 ORDER, granting 2469 Joint MOTION to Continue and Reschedule Status Conference filed by U.S. Bank, National Association. ( Status Conference reset for 3/7/2011 11:00 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge David Folsom.). Signed by Judge David Folsom on 2/15/11. (mrm, )
February 14, 2011 Filing 2469 Joint MOTION to Continue and Reschedule Status Conference by U.S. Bank, National Association. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Harrison, Guy)
February 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 2468 ORDER, ( Status Conference set for 3/3/2011 02:00 PM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before Judge David Folsom.). Signed by Judge David Folsom on 2/11/11. (mrm, )
February 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 2467 ORDER re: revised Final Judgment; Any comments regarding the form of this revised draft Final Judgment should be submitted to the undersigned by letter no later than February 14, 2011. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 2/2/11. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(mrm, )
January 26, 2011 Filing 2466 NOTICE by U.S. Bank, National Association of Letter Filing (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Letter)(Feldhaus, John)
January 26, 2011 Filing 2465 NOTICE by Viewpointe Archive Services, LLC of Compliance With Court's Order (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Sammi, Paramjeet)
January 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 2464 ORDER; A draft Final Judgment is attached to this Order as Exhibit A. Any comments regarding the form of this draft Final Judgment should be submitted to the undersigned by letter within 14 days of this Order. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 1/12/11. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(mrm, )
January 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 2463 ORDER granting 2452 Sealed Brief in Support of its Right to Post-Verdict Royalties. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 1/12/11. (mrm, )
January 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 2462 ORDER granting 2461 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Adam A Biggs terminated as counsel for pltf. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 1/7/11. (ehs, )
January 6, 2011 Filing 2461 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Withdraw Adam A. Biggs as Counsel of Record by Datatreasury Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Albritton, Eric)
December 8, 2010 Filing 2460 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on November 12, 2010, Status Conference before The Honorable Chief Judge David Folsom. Court Reporter: Libby Crawford, CSR,, Telephone number: 903.794.4067 Ext. 237 or lcrawford@cableone.net. <P>NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov<P> Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 1/3/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/13/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/11/2011. (aec, )
December 8, 2010 Filing 2459 Defendant U.S. Bank's Sealed Surreply in Opposition to Plaintiff's Reply Brief in Support of Post-Verdict Royalties - Sealed Document. (Feldhaus, John)
December 6, 2010 Filing 2458 Plaintiff DataTreasury Corporation's Sealed Reply Brief in Support of its Right to Post-Verdict Royalties (DKT 2452) (Roach, Nelson)
December 3, 2010 Filing 2457 Defendant U.S. Bank's Sealed Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Brief in Support of Post-Verdict Royalties - Sealed Document. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Feldhaus, John)
November 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2456 ORDER, granting 2454 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Nida Nadir filed by Datatreasury Corporation., Attorney Nida Nadir terminated. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 11/24/10. (mrm, )
November 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2455 ORDER, granting 2453 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Arianna Frankl filed by Datatreasury Corporation., Attorney Arianna Frankl terminated. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 11/24/10. (mrm, )
November 23, 2010 Filing 2454 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Nida Nadir by Datatreasury Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Roach, Nelson)
November 23, 2010 Filing 2453 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Arianna Frankl by Datatreasury Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Roach, Nelson)
November 19, 2010 Filing 2452 Plaintiff DataTreasury Corporation's Sealed Brief in Support of its Right to Post-Verdict Royalties - Sealed Document. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Roach, Nelson)
November 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2451 ORDER re: dispute regarding the availability of post-verdict royalties; Plaintiff's brief on this issue shall be filed no later than November 19, 2010. Defendants' response shall be filed no later than December 3, 2010. Plaintiff's reply, if any, shall be filed no later than December 6, 2010. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 11/12/10. (mrm, )
November 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2450 ORDER denying as moot 2074 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law; denying as moot 2075 Sealed Motion; denying as moot 2076 Sealed Motion; denying as moot 2077 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 11/12/10. (mrm, )
November 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2449 ORDER granting 2116 Motion for Partial Judgment as a Matter of Law. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 11/12/10. (mrm, )
November 12, 2010 Filing 2448 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge David Folsom: Status Conference held on 11/12/2010. (Court Reporter Libby Crawford.) (mrm, )
October 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2447 ORDER, granting 2444 Agreed Motion to Dismiss Defendants Bank of America, National Association and LaSalle Bank, National Association with Prejudice filed by Bank of America, National Association, Lasalle Bank NA, Datatreasury Corporation. Lasalle Bank NA, and Bank of America, National Association terminated. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 10/28/10. (mrm, )
October 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2446 ORDER, granting 2445 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss WITH PREJUDICE filed by Suntrust Bank. Suntrust Bank terminated. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 10/28/10. (mrm, )
October 27, 2010 Filing 2445 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss WITH PREJUDICE by Suntrust Bank. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
October 27, 2010 Filing 2444 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Agreed Motion to Dismiss Defendants Bank of America, National Association and LaSalle Bank, National Association with Prejudice by Bank of America, National Association, Datatreasury Corporation, Lasalle Bank NA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Agreed Order)(Melsheimer, Thomas)
October 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2443 ORDER, ( Status Conference set for 11/12/2010 10:00 AM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before Judge David Folsom.). Signed by Judge David Folsom on 10/18/10. (mrm, )
October 18, 2010 Filing 2440 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 10/14/10 Morning Session before Judge David Folsom. Court Reporter/Transcriber: S. Simmons/J. Werlinger,Telephone number: 903/935-3868. <P>NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov<P> Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 11/12/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/22/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/20/2011. (lss, )
October 18, 2010 Filing 2439 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 10/13/10 Afternoon Session before Judge David Folsom. Court Reporter/Transcriber: S. Simmons/J. Werlinger,Telephone number: 903/935-3868. <P>NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov<P> Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 11/12/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/22/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/20/2011. (lss, )
October 18, 2010 Filing 2438 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 10/13/10 Morning Session before Judge David Folsom. Court Reporter/Transcriber: S. Simmons/J. Werlinger,Telephone number: 903/935-3868. <P>NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov<P> Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 11/12/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/22/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/20/2011. (lss, )
October 18, 2010 Filing 2437 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 10/12/10 Afternoon Proceedings before Judge David Folsom. Court Reporter/Transcriber: S. Simmons/J. Werlinger,Telephone number: 903/935-3868. <P>NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov<P> Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 11/12/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/22/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/20/2011. (lss, )
October 18, 2010 Filing 2436 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 10/12/10 Voir Dire Proceedings before Judge David Folsom. Court Reporter/Transcriber: S. Simmons/J. Werlinger,Telephone number: 903/935-3868. <P>NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov<P> Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 11/12/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/22/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/20/2011. (lss, )
October 15, 2010 Filing 2442 Jury Trial Witness List. (mrm, )
October 15, 2010 Filing 2441 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge David Folsom: Jury Trial held on 10/12/2010, and completed on 10/15/2010. (Court Reporter Judy Werlinger.) (mrm, )
October 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2435 ORDER re: Defendants' objections to Plaintiff's deposition designations as to John Dunn. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 10/14/10. (mrm, )
October 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2434 ORDER re: Defendants' objections to Plaintiff's deposition designations as to Jerry Chambers and Irwin L. Kellner. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 10/13/10. (mrm, )
October 12, 2010 Filing 2433 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Michael M Rosen for Bank of America, National Association,Michael M Rosen for Lasalle Bank NA. (APPROVED, FEE PAID)(ehs, )
October 12, 2010 Filing 2432 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge David Folsom: Jury Selection held on 10/12/2010. (Court Reporter Judy Werlinger.) (mrm, )
October 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2431 ORDER granting 2429 Motion for Admission of Certain Exhibits. Ruling set forth herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 10/12/10. (ehs, )
October 12, 2010 Filing 2430 Additional Attachments to Main Document: 2429 Joint MOTION Admission of Trial Exhibits.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Roach, Nelson)
October 12, 2010 Filing 2429 Joint MOTION Admission of Trial Exhibits by Datatreasury Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Roach, Nelson)
October 12, 2010 Filing 2428 NOTICE by Datatreasury Corporation of Objections to Evidentiary Rulings (Roach, Nelson)
October 12, 2010 Filing 2427 NOTICE by Datatreasury Corporation Plaintiff DataTreasury's Third Amended Proposed Verdict Form (Roach, Nelson)
October 12, 2010 Filing 2426 NOTICE by Datatreasury Corporation re Plaintiff DataTreasury Corporation's Notice of Dropped Claims (Roach, Nelson)
October 12, 2010 Filing 2425 NOTICE by Bank of America, National Association, Lasalle Bank NA of Objections to Evidentiary Rulings (Melsheimer, Thomas)
October 12, 2010 Filing 2424 NOTICE by Suntrust Bank, Suntrust Banks, Inc. DEFENDANT SUNTRUST'S OBJECTIONS TO EVIDENTIARY RULINGS BY JUDGE EVERINGHAM (Baxter, Samuel)
October 11, 2010 Filing 2423 Proposed Jury Instructions by Bank of America, National Association, Lasalle Bank NA, Suntrust Bank. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Melsheimer, Thomas)
October 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2422 ORDER, Defendants' objection to Plaintiff's demonstrative is hereby SUSTAINED ASMODIFIED re: Dr. Smith. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 10/11/10. (mrm, )
October 11, 2010 Filing 2421 NOTICE by Datatreasury Corporation Plaintiff DataTreasury Corporation's Second Amended Phase III Proposed Verdict Form (Roach, Nelson)
October 11, 2010 Filing 2420 NOTICE by Datatreasury Corporation Plaintiff DataTreasury Corporation's First Amended Phase III Proposed Jury Instructions (Roach, Nelson)
October 11, 2010 Filing 2419 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on October 8, 2010, Pretrial Hearing before The Honorable Chief Judge David Folsom. Court Reporter: Libby Crawford, CSR, Telephone number: 903.794.4067 Ext. 237 or lcrawford@cableone.net. <P>NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov<P> Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 11/4/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/15/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/13/2011. (aec, )
October 10, 2010 Filing 2418 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 10/7/10 Exhibit Hearing before Judge Chad Everingham. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Susan Simmons, CSR,Telephone number: 903/935-3868. <P>NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov<P> Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 11/4/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/15/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/13/2011. (lss, )
October 8, 2010 Filing 2417 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss by Suntrust Banks, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
October 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2416 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 2404 Motion in Limine re Topic 38 and Topic 20. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 10/8/2010. (sm, )
October 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2415 ORDER that dfts objections and request to preclude pla "beneficial use" theory are DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 10/8/2010. (sm, )
October 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2414 ORDER ruling on objections to pla depositions. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 10/8/2010. (sm, )
October 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2413 ORDER AFFIRMING Judge Everingham's ruling on hearsay objection and AFFIRMS Judge Everingham's overruling of any objection under Federal Rule of Evidence 403. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 10/8/2010. (sm, )
October 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2412 ORDER DENYING Dfts request to exclude the recent Inventor of the Year Award. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 10/8/2010. (sm, )
October 8, 2010 Filing 2411 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Taj Jamar Clayton on behalf of Bank of America, National Association, Lasalle Bank NA (Clayton, Taj)
October 8, 2010 Filing 2410 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Juanita R Brooks for Bank of America, National Association,Juanita R Brooks for Lasalle Bank NA. (APPROVED, FEE PAID) (ehs, )
October 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2409 ORDER re Pre-admission of trial exhibits. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on October 8, 2010. (jml)
October 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2407 ORDER, granting 2402 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice filed by Bank of America Corporation, Lasalle Bank Corporation, Datatreasury Corporation. Bank of America Corporation and Lasalle Bank Corporation terminated. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 10/8/10. (mrm, )
October 8, 2010 Filing 2406 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge David Folsom: Hearing held on 10/8/2010. (Court Reporter Libby Crawford.) (mrm, )
October 8, 2010 Filing 2405 NOTICE by Datatreasury Corporation Plaintiff DataTreasury's Notice and Objections Regarding Defendants' Additional List of References (Chin, Edward)
October 7, 2010 Filing 2408 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham: Evidentiary Hearing held on 10/7/2010. (Court Reporter Susan Simmons, CSR.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign in Sheet) (jml)
October 7, 2010 Filing 2404 MOTION in Limine Joint Motion to Grant as Modified Plaintiff's Motion in Limine Top 28, and to Deny as Modified Defendants' Motion in Limine Topic 20 by Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America, National Association, Datatreasury Corporation, Lasalle Bank Corporation, Lasalle Bank NA, Suntrust Bank, Suntrust Banks, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Melsheimer, Thomas)
October 7, 2010 Filing 2403 NOTICE by Suntrust Bank, Suntrust Banks, Inc. re 2401 Notice (Other) SUNTRUST BANKS, INC. AND SUNTRUST BANK'S JOINDER IN NOTICE REGARDING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE (Baxter, Samuel)
October 7, 2010 Filing 2402 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice by Bank of America Corporation, Datatreasury Corporation, Lasalle Bank Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Agreed Order of Dismissal with Prejudice)(Melsheimer, Thomas)
October 7, 2010 Filing 2401 NOTICE by Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America, National Association, Lasalle Bank Corporation, Lasalle Bank NA Defendants' Notice Regarding Pretrial Conference (Melsheimer, Thomas)
October 7, 2010 Filing 2400 NOTICE by Datatreasury Corporation of Partial Agreement Regarding Number of Prior Art References (Plaintiff's in Limine topic 55) (Roach, Nelson)
October 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2399 ORDER re: hearsay procedures. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 10/6/10. (mrm, )
October 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2398 ORDER re: preliminary jury instructions. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 10/7/10. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(mrm, )
October 6, 2010 Filing 2397 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on September 30, 2010, Pretrial Hearing before The Honorable Chief Judge David Folsom. Court Reporter: Libby Crawford, CSR, Telephone number: 903.794.4067 Ext. 237 or lcrawford@cableone.net. <P>NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov<P> Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 11/1/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/12/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/7/2011. (aec, )
October 6, 2010 Filing 2396 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Brett Johnson on behalf of Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America, National Association, Lasalle Bank Corporation, Lasalle Bank NA (Johnson, Michael)
October 6, 2010 Filing 2395 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Andrew Bittner on behalf of Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America, National Association, Lasalle Bank Corporation, Lasalle Bank NA (Bittner, Michael)
October 6, 2010 Filing 2394 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Timothy Devlin for Bank of America, National Association,Timothy Devlin for Lasalle Bank NA. (ch, )
October 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2393 ORDER; The Court hereby ORDERS that each side will have 23.5 hours for case presentation including direct examination, cross-examination, redirect, and rebuttal. This time limit does not include time related to jury selection, opening, closing, and transition statements. The Defendants shall share in their side's time. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 10/5/10. (mrm, )
October 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2392 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 2306 Sealed Motion in Limine for the Phase III Trial; granting in part and denying in part 2311 Sealed Motion in Limine; ORDERS that the parties meet and confer regarding Plaintiff's in limine item number 55 and advise the Court of their agreement or non-agreement by October 7, 2010, at 12:00 P.M. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 10/5/10. (mrm, )
October 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2391 ORDER re: exchange of initial demonstratives. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 10/5/10. (mrm, )
October 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2390 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham for the purpose of hearing exhibit objections for Phase III trial. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 10/5/10. (mrm, )
October 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2389 ORDER re: voir dire introduction time. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 10/5/10. (mrm, )
October 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2388 ORDER denying 2267 Sealed Motion to Add Defendants Viewpointe Archive Services, LLC, and the Clearing House Payments Company, LLC, as Parties to the Phase III Trial. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 10/1/10. (mrm, )
October 1, 2010 Filing 2387 NOTICE of Hearing: Hearing on pre-admission of exhibits set for 10/7/2010, 02:00 PM, in Mag Ctrm (Marshall) before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham. (delat, )
October 1, 2010 Filing 2386 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ivan Wang on behalf of Suntrust Bank, Suntrust Banks, Inc. (Wang, Ivan)
September 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2385 ORDER, granting 2376 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss filed by Keybank National Association, Keycorp. Keybank National Association, and Keycorp terminated. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 9/30/10. (mrm, )
September 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2384 PHASE III JOINT FINAL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 9/30/10. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(mrm, )
September 30, 2010 Filing 2383 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge David Folsom: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 9/30/2010. (Court Reporter Libby Crawford.) (mrm, ) (Main Document 2383 replaced on 10/4/2010) (mrm, ).
September 29, 2010 Filing 2382 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Laurie LaVigna Fitzgerald on behalf of Suntrust Bank, Suntrust Banks, Inc. (Fitzgerald, Laurie)
September 29, 2010 Filing 2381 Proposed Pretrial Order by Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America, National Association, Datatreasury Corporation, Lasalle Bank Corporation, Lasalle Bank NA, Suntrust Bank, Suntrust Banks, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Melsheimer, Thomas)
September 29, 2010 Filing 2380 NOTICE by Datatreasury Corporation First Amended Proposed Phase III Verdict Form (Roach, Nelson)
September 29, 2010 Filing 2379 Proposed Jury Instructions by Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America, National Association, Lasalle Bank Corporation, Lasalle Bank NA, Suntrust Bank, Suntrust Banks, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Melsheimer, Thomas)
September 29, 2010 Filing 2378 NOTICE by Datatreasury Corporation Proposed Phase III Verdict Form (Roach, Nelson)
September 29, 2010 Filing 2377 Proposed Jury Instructions by Datatreasury Corporation. (Roach, Nelson)
September 29, 2010 Filing 2376 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss by Keybank National Association, Keycorp. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
September 29, 2010 Filing 2375 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 2359 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Unseal: (1) Defendants' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order to Suppress DataTreasury's First Amendment Rights; and (2) Plaintiff's Response to that Motion, Designated as Dkt. Nos. 2350 & 2353 filed by Datatreasury Corporation. (Roach, Nelson)
September 29, 2010 Filing 2374 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 2359 filed by Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America, National Association, Keybank National Association, Keycorp, Lasalle Bank Corporation, Lasalle Bank NA, Suntrust Bank, Suntrust Banks, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Parker, Robert)
September 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2373 ORDER granting 2361 Motion to Expedite. Defendants shall file a response to Plaintiff's Motion to Unseal by September 29, 2010, at 12:00 P.M. Plaintiffs reply, if any, shall be filed by September 29, 2010, at 5:00 P.M. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 9/28/10. (mrm, )
September 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2372 ORDER at Initial Pretrial Conference set for 9/30/2010 10:00 AM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before Judge David Folsom, the parties should be prepared to discuss motions 2311 SEALED MOTION In Limine filed by Bank of America, National Association, Suntrust Banks, Inc., Bank of America Corporation, Keybank National Association, Keycorp, Lasalle Bank NA, Lasalle Bank Corporation, Suntrust Bank, and 2306 SEALED MOTION in Limine for the Phase III Trial filed by Datatreasury Corporation. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 9/28/10. (mrm, )
September 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2371 ORDER denying 2133 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 9/27/10. (mrm, )
September 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2370 ORDER denying 2132 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 9/27/10. (mrm, )
September 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2369 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 2131 Sealed Motion of The Clearing House Payments Company L.L.C. for Judgment as a Matter of Law. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 9/27/10. (mrm, )
September 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2368 ORDER denying 2130 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law of No Willful Infringement. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 9/27/10. (mrm, )
September 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2367 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 2129 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 9/27/10. (mrm, )
September 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2366 ORDER denying 2128 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 9/27/10. (mrm, )
September 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2365 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 2127 Sealed Patent Motion for Enhanced Damages as to U.S. Bank and Viewpointe, and for "Exceptional Matter" Determination. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 9/27/10. (mrm, )
September 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2364 ORDER denying 2125 Renewed Motion of the Phase I Defendants for Judgment as a Matter of Law. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 9/27/10. (mrm, )
September 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2363 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 2124 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law. These rulings apply only to Phase I. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 9/27/10. (mrm, )
September 27, 2010 Filing 2362 RESPONSE in Opposition re 2361 Opposed MOTION to Expedite Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Unseal Dkt. Nos. 2350 & 2353 (Dkt. No. 2359) filed by Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America, National Association, Keybank National Association, Keycorp, Lasalle Bank Corporation, Lasalle Bank NA, Suntrust Bank, Suntrust Banks, Inc.. (Melsheimer, Thomas)
September 27, 2010 Filing 2361 Opposed MOTION to Expedite Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Unseal Dkt. Nos. 2350 & 2353 (Dkt. No. 2359) by Datatreasury Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Roach, Nelson)
September 27, 2010 NOTICE of DEFICIENCY regarding the #2360 Motion to expedite response submitted by Datatreasury Corporation. no certificate of conference included. Correction should be made by 1 business day and refiled. This motion is now terminated. (sm, )
September 27, 2010 Filing 2360 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT, PLEASE IGNORE.***MOTION to Expedite Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Unseal Dkt. Nos. 2350 & 2353 (Dkt. No. 2359) by Datatreasury Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Roach, Nelson) Modified on 9/27/2010 (sm, ).
September 27, 2010 Filing 2359 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Unseal: (1) Defendants' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order to Suppress DataTreasury's First Amendment Rights; and (2) Plaintiff's Response to that Motion, Designated as Dkt. Nos. 2350 & 2353 by Datatreasury Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Roach, Nelson)
September 24, 2010 Filing 2356 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION EMERGENCY MOTION by Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America, National Association, Lasalle Bank Corporation, Lasalle Bank NA. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Parker, Robert)
September 24, 2010 Filing 2355 NOTICE by Datatreasury Corporation Notice of Estimated Trial Time (Bruster, Anthony)
September 24, 2010 Filing 2354 NOTICE by Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America, National Association, Keybank National Association, Keycorp, Lasalle Bank Corporation, Lasalle Bank NA, Suntrust Bank, Suntrust Banks, Inc. of Estimated Trial Time (Melsheimer, Thomas)
September 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2352 ORDER granting 2351 Sealed Patent Motion to expedite. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 9/22/10. (mrm, )
September 22, 2010 Filing 2351 SEALED PATENT MOTION by Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America, National Association, Keybank National Association, Keycorp, Lasalle Bank Corporation, Lasalle Bank NA, Suntrust Bank, Suntrust Banks, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Parker, Robert)
September 22, 2010 Filing 2350 SEALED PATENT MOTION by Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America, National Association, Keybank National Association, Keycorp, Lasalle Bank Corporation, Lasalle Bank NA, Suntrust Bank, Suntrust Banks, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Text of Proposed Order)(Parker, Robert)
September 21, 2010 Filing 2349 DATATREASURY CORPORATION'S SEALED SUR-REPLY to Response to Motion re 2311 SEALED MOTION In Limine filed by Datatreasury Corporation. (Roach, Nelson)
September 20, 2010 Filing 2348 AMENDED TRIAL Witness List by Keybank National Association, Keycorp, Suntrust Bank, Suntrust Banks, Inc.. (Baxter, Samuel)
September 17, 2010 Filing 2347 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 2277 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (RELATED TO THE RANDLE PATENTS) filed by Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America, National Association, Lasalle Bank Corporation, Lasalle Bank NA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Melsheimer, Thomas)
September 17, 2010 Filing 2346 NOTICE by Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America, National Association, Keybank National Association, Keycorp, Lasalle Bank Corporation, Lasalle Bank NA, Suntrust Bank, Suntrust Banks, Inc. of Compliance with Court's Amended Docket Control Order (Melsheimer, Thomas)
September 17, 2010 Filing 2345 NOTICE by Datatreasury Corporation of its Compliance with the Docket Control Order - Service of its Objections to the Phase III Defendants' Exhibit Lists and Page & Line Designations (Roach, Nelson)
September 16, 2010 Filing 2344 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Guy N Harrison on behalf of U.S. Bank, National Association (Harrison, Guy)
September 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2343 ORDER granting 2340 Motion to Submit Jury Questionnaire. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 9/16/2010. (mrm, )
September 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2342 ORDER granting 2338 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 9/16/10. (mrm, )
September 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2341 ORDER granting 2336 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages on its Reply in Support of its Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 9/16/10. (mrm, )
September 15, 2010 Filing 2340 Joint MOTION Joint Motion to Submit Jury Questionnaire by Datatreasury Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - DTCs Proposed Questionnaire, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Defendants Proposed Questionnaire, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Roach, Nelson)
September 14, 2010 Filing 2339 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 2311 SEALED MOTION In Limine filed by Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America, National Association, Keybank National Association, Keycorp, Lasalle Bank Corporation, Lasalle Bank NA, Suntrust Bank, Suntrust Banks, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Melsheimer, Thomas)
September 14, 2010 Filing 2338 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America, National Association, Keybank National Association, Keycorp, Lasalle Bank Corporation, Lasalle Bank NA, Suntrust Bank, Suntrust Banks, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Melsheimer, Thomas)
September 14, 2010 Filing 2337 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 2306 SEALED MOTION in Limine for the Phase III Trial filed by Datatreasury Corporation. (Roach, Nelson)
September 14, 2010 Filing 2336 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages on its Reply in Support of its Motion in Limine by Datatreasury Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Roach, Nelson)
September 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2335 ORDER denying 1842 Sealed Patent Motion to Strike Portions of the ExpertReports and Testimony of Dr. Hugh Smith. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 9/13/10. (mrm, )
September 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2334 ORDER denying 1840 Sealed Patent Motion to Strike Portions of the Expert Report and Testimony of Mr. John Hiles. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 9/13/10. (mrm, )
September 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2333 ORDER granting as modified as to Phase III 1837 Opposed SEALED MOTION TO LIMIT EXPERT TESTIMONY ON DIRECTION AND CONTROL filed by Datatreasury Corporation. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 9/13/10. (mrm, )
September 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2332 ORDER granting as to Phase III 1836 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Christopher Bokhart filed by U.S. Bank, National Association, U.S. Bancorp. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 9/13/10. (mrm, )
September 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2331 ORDER granting 2326 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 9/8/10. (mrm, )
September 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2330 ORDER granting 2323 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages for its Response to the Phase III Defendants' Omnibus Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 9/8/10. (mrm, )
September 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2329 ORDER granting 2322 Motion for Leave to Subpoena Intuit Inc.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 9/8/10. (mrm, )
September 7, 2010 Filing 2328 NOTICE by Datatreasury Corporation Compliance of Service of its Objections and Counter Designations to the Phase III Defendants' Page and Line Designations (Roach, Nelson)
September 7, 2010 Filing 2327 SEALED RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re 2306 SEALED MOTION in Limine for the Phase III Trial filed by Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America, National Association, Keybank National Association, Keycorp, Lasalle Bank Corporation, Lasalle Bank NA, Suntrust Bank, Suntrust Banks, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D) (Melsheimer, Thomas)
September 7, 2010 Filing 2326 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America, National Association, Keybank National Association, Keycorp, Lasalle Bank Corporation, Lasalle Bank NA, Suntrust Bank, Suntrust Banks, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Melsheimer, Thomas)
September 7, 2010 Filing 2325 DATATREASURY CORPORATION'S SEALED RESPONSE to THE PHASE III DEFENDANTS' OMNIBUS MOTION IN LIMINE re 2311 SEALED MOTION In Limine filed by Datatreasury Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit AA, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit BB, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit CC, # 7 Exhibit D, # 8 Exhibit DD, # 9 Exhibit E, # 10 Exhibit EE, # 11 Exhibit F, # 12 Exhibit FF, # 13 Exhibit G, # 14 Exhibit GG, # 15 Exhibit H, # 16 Exhibit HH, # 17 Exhibit I, # 18 Exhibit II, # 19 Exhibit J, # 20 Exhibit JJ, # 21 Exhibit K, # 22 Exhibit L, # 23 Exhibit M, # 24 Exhibit N, # 25 Exhibit O, # 26 Exhibit P, # 27 Exhibit Q, # 28 Exhibit R, # 29 Exhibit S, # 30 Exhibit T, # 31 Exhibit U, # 32 Exhibit V, # 33 Exhibit W, # 34 Exhibit X, # 35 Exhibit Y, # 36 Exhibit Z, # 37 Text of Proposed Order)(Roach, Nelson)
September 7, 2010 Filing 2324 REPLY to Response to Motion re 2277 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (RELATED TO THE RANDLE PATENTS) filed by Datatreasury Corporation. (Roach, Nelson)
September 7, 2010 Filing 2323 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages regarding its Response to the Phase III Defendants Omnibus Motion in Limine by Datatreasury Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Roach, Nelson)
September 7, 2010 Filing 2322 Unopposed MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUBPOENA INTUIT INC. by Keybank National Association, Keycorp, Suntrust Bank, Suntrust Banks, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
September 2, 2010 Filing 2321 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 2267 SEALED MOTION to add The Clearing House and Viewpointe as Parties to the Phase III Trial filed by Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America, National Association, Keybank National Association, Keycorp, Lasalle Bank Corporation, Lasalle Bank NA, Suntrust Bank, Suntrust Banks, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Melsheimer, Thomas)
September 2, 2010 Filing 2320 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 2267 SEALED MOTION to add The Clearing House and Viewpointe as Parties to the Phase III Trial filed by The Clearing House Payments Company, LLC, Viewpointe Archive Services, LLC. (McGee, Preston)
September 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2319 ORDER denying as moot 2179 Sealed Motion to Add Defendants Viewpointe Archive Services, LLC and The Clearing House Payments Company, LLC as Parties to the Phase II Trial. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 9/1/10. (mrm, )
September 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2318 ORDER granting 2313 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 9/1/10. (mrm, )
September 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2317 ORDER granting 2305 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages for its Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 9/1/10. (mrm, )
September 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2316 ORDER, denying as moot 2230 SEALED PATENT MOTION In Limine and to Exclude filed by Bancorpsouth, Inc., Bancorp South Bank, denying as moot 2228 SEALED MOTION in Limine for the Phase II Trial filed by Datatreasury Corporation. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 9/1/10. (mrm, )
August 30, 2010 Filing 2315 Sealed Notice of Compliance with Court's Amended Docket Control Order for Phase III Trial (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit 1 - Bank of America Corp, Bank of America N.A., LaSalle Bank Corp, LaSalle Bank NA Deposition Counter-Designations, # 2 Exhibit A - List of Deposition Counter-Designations)(Melsheimer, Thomas)
August 30, 2010 Filing 2314 NOTICE by Keybank National Association, Keycorp, Suntrust Bank, Suntrust Banks, Inc. COUNTER-DESIGNATIONS TO PLAINTIFFS' DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Baxter, Samuel)
August 30, 2010 Filing 2313 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America, National Association, Keybank National Association, Keycorp, Lasalle Bank Corporation, Lasalle Bank NA, Suntrust Bank, Suntrust Banks, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Melsheimer, Thomas)
August 27, 2010 Filing 2312 Sealed Notice of Compliance with Court's Amended Docket Control Order for Phase III Trial by Bank of America Corp., Bank of America N.A., LaSalle Bank Corp., and LaSalle Bank N.A. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit 1-Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures Pre-Trial Statement with Witness List, #(2) Exhibit A-Deposition Designations, #(3) Exhibit B-Exhibit List) (Melsheimer, Thomas)
August 27, 2010 Filing 2311 SEALED MOTION In Limine by Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America, National Association, Keybank National Association, Keycorp, Lasalle Bank Corporation, Lasalle Bank NA, Suntrust Bank, Suntrust Banks, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F)(Melsheimer, Thomas)
August 27, 2010 Filing 2310 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT. SUNTRUST BANKS, INC., SUNTRUST BANK, KEYCORP AND KEYBANK'S TRIAL EXHIBIT LIST (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Baxter, Samuel)
August 27, 2010 Filing 2309 Trial Witness List by Keybank National Association, Keycorp, Suntrust Bank, Suntrust Banks, Inc.. (Baxter, Samuel)
August 27, 2010 Filing 2308 NOTICE by Keybank National Association, Keycorp, Suntrust Bank, Suntrust Banks, Inc. DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Baxter, Samuel)
August 27, 2010 Filing 2307 RESPONSE in Opposition re 2277 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (RELATED TO THE RANDLE PATENTS) filed by Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America, National Association. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Melsheimer, Thomas)
August 27, 2010 Filing 2306 SEALED MOTION in Limine for the Phase III Trial by Datatreasury Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Roach, Nelson)
August 27, 2010 Filing 2305 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages on its Motion in Limine by Datatreasury Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Roach, Nelson)
August 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2304 ORDER granting 2298 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages on its Sur-Reply to Defendants' Motion to Exclude Testimony of Christopher J. Bokhart on Commercial Success. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 8/24/10. (mrm, )
August 23, 2010 Filing 2303 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 1837 Opposed SEALED MOTION TO LIMIT EXPERT TESTIMONY ON DIRECTION AND CONTROL filed by Keybank National Association, Keycorp, Suntrust Bank, Suntrust Banks, Inc.. (Baxter, Samuel)
August 23, 2010 Filing 2302 DATATREASURY CORPORATION'S SEALED SUR REPLY to Response to Motion re 1840 SEALED PATENT MOTION STRIKE PORTION OF THE EXPERT REPORT AND TESTIMONY OF MR. JOHN BILES filed by Datatreasury Corporation. (Roach, Nelson)
August 23, 2010 Filing 2301 DATATREASURY CORPORATION'S SEALED SUR REPLY to Response to Motion re 1842 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE EXPERT REPORTS AND TESTIMONY OF DR. HUGH SMITH filed by Datatreasury Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Roach, Nelson)
August 23, 2010 Filing 2300 DATATREASURY CORPORATION'S SEALED SUR REPLY to Response to Motion re 1836 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Christopher Bokhart filed by Datatreasury Corporation. (Roach, Nelson)
August 23, 2010 Filing 2299 DATATREASURY CORPORATION'S SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 2267 SEALED MOTION to add The Clearing House and Viewpointe as Parties to the Phase III Trial filed by Datatreasury Corporation. (Roach, Nelson)
August 23, 2010 Filing 2298 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages on its Sur-Reply to Defendants' Motion to Exclude Testimony of Christopher J. Bokhart on Commercial Success (Dkt. No. 1836) by Datatreasury Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Roach, Nelson)
August 20, 2010 Filing 2297 NOTICE by Datatreasury Corporation Notice of Compliance Giving Notice of its Service of its Exhibit List to the Phase III Defendants (Roach, Nelson)
August 20, 2010 Filing 2296 NOTICE by Datatreasury Corporation Notice of Compliance Giving Notice of its Service of its Witness List to the Phase III Defendants (Roach, Nelson)
August 20, 2010 Filing 2295 NOTICE by Datatreasury Corporation Notice of Compliance Giving Notice of its Service of its Page and Line Designations to the Phase III Defendants) (Roach, Nelson)
August 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2294 ORDER, ( Initial Pretrial Conference set for 9/30/2010 10:00 AM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before Judge David Folsom.) It is hereby ORDERED that by September 24, 2010, at 1:00 P.M., the Phase III parties shall electronically file Notice(s), either jointly or independently, with estimates of the time required for the Phase III trial. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 8/19/10. (mrm, )
August 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2293 ORDER granting 2289 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages for its Reply in Support of its Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony on Direction or Control. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 8/17/10. (mrm, )
August 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2292 ORDER granting 2282 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages for Reply in Support of Motion to Exclude Testimony of Plaintiff DataTreasury Corporation's Expert, Christopher J. Bokhart, on Commercial Success. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 8/17/10. (mrm, )
August 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2291 ORDER granting 2285 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages for Reply in Support of Defendants SunTrust Bank and SunTrust Banks, Inc.'s Motion to Strike Portions of the Expert Report and Testimony of Mr. John Hiles. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 8/17/10. (mrm, )
August 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2290 ORDER granting 2287 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages for Reply in Support of Defendants KeyCorp and KeyBank National Associations Motion to Strike Portions of the Expert Reports and Testimony of Dr. Hugh Smith. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 8/17/10. (mrm, )
August 16, 2010 ***FILED IN ERROR, PER ATTY, ATTY HAS REFILED (SEE #2284). Document # 2283, Sealed Patent Surreply. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (sm, )
August 16, 2010 Filing 2289 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for its Reply in Support of its Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony on Direction and Control (DKT. #1837) by Datatreasury Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Roach, Nelson)
August 13, 2010 Filing 2288 SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 1842 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE EXPERT REPORTS AND TESTIMONY OF DR. HUGH SMITH filed by Keybank National Association, Keycorp. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Baxter, Samuel)
August 13, 2010 Filing 2287 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages FOR REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS KEYCORP AND KEYBANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION'S MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE EXPERT REPORTS AND TESTIMONY OF DR. HUGH SMITH by Keybank National Association, Keycorp. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
August 13, 2010 Filing 2286 SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 1840 SEALED PATENT MOTION STRIKE PORTION OF THE EXPERT REPORT AND TESTIMONY OF MR. JOHN BILES filed by Suntrust Bank, Suntrust Banks, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Baxter, Samuel)
August 13, 2010 Filing 2285 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages FOR REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS SUNTRUST BANK AND SUNTRUST BANKS, INC.'S MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE EXPERT REPORT AND TESTIMONY OF MR. JOHN HILES by Suntrust Bank, Suntrust Banks, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
August 13, 2010 Filing 2284 ***REPLACES #2283***SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 1836 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Christopher Bokhart filed by Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America, National Association, Keybank National Association, Keycorp, Lasalle Bank Corporation, Lasalle Bank NA, Suntrust Bank, Suntrust Banks, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Victoria L. Wicken, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3)(Baxter, Samuel) Modified on 8/16/2010 (sm, ).
August 13, 2010 Filing 2283 ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE.***SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 1836 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Christopher Bokhart filed by Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America, National Association, Keybank National Association, Keycorp, Lasalle Bank Corporation, Lasalle Bank NA, Suntrust Bank, Suntrust Banks, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Victoria L. Wicken, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3)(Baxter, Samuel) Modified on 8/16/2010 (sm, ).
August 13, 2010 Filing 2282 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages FOR PHASE III DEFENDANTS' REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF CHRISTOPHER J. BOKHART ON COMMERCIAL SUCCESS by Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America, National Association, Keybank National Association, Keycorp, Lasalle Bank Corporation, Lasalle Bank NA, Suntrust Bank, Suntrust Banks, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
August 13, 2010 Filing 2281 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 2267 SEALED MOTION to add The Clearing House and Viewpointe as Parties to the Phase III Trial filed by Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America, National Association, Keybank National Association, Keycorp, Lasalle Bank Corporation, Lasalle Bank NA, Suntrust Bank, Suntrust Banks, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Melsheimer, Thomas)
August 13, 2010 Filing 2280 DATATREASURY CORPORATION'S SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 1837 Opposed SEALED MOTION TO LIMIT EXPERT TESTIMONY ON DIRECTION AND CONTROL filed by Datatreasury Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Roach, Nelson)
August 13, 2010 Filing 2279 RESPONSE in Opposition re 2267 SEALED MOTION to add The Clearing House and Viewpointe as Parties to the Phase III Trial filed by The Clearing House Payments Company, LLC, Viewpointe Archive Services, LLC. (McGee, Preston)
August 10, 2010 Filing 2278 NOTICE by The Clearing House Payments Company, LLC, Viewpointe Archive Services, LLC re 2124 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Renewed Joinder and Motion of Viewpointe for Judgment as a Matter of Law and Brief in Support, 2131 SEALED MOTION Renewed Joinder and Motion of TCH for Judgment as a Matter of Law and Brief in Support Notice of Additional Legal Authority (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Additional Legal Authority)(McGee, Preston)
August 10, 2010 Filing 2277 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (RELATED TO THE RANDLE PATENTS) by Datatreasury Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Roach, Nelson)
August 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2276 ORDER of USCA denying 2010 writ of mandamus(rml, )
August 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2275 ORDER; The Court therefore hereby CANCELS the August 13, 2010 status conference. The Court will set a preliminary final pretrial conference for a date to be determined. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 8/9/10. (mrm, )
August 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2274 ORDER granting 2269 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages for its Responses to Defendants' Motions to Strike (Responses to Dkt. Nos. 1840 & 1842 ). Signed by Judge David Folsom on 8/4/10. (mrm, )
August 3, 2010 Filing 2273 DATAREASURY CORPORATION'S SEALED RESPONSE to KEYBANK'S Motion re 1842 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE EXPERT REPORTS AND TESTIMONY OF DR. HUGH SMITH filed by Datatreasury Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M)(Roach, Nelson)
August 3, 2010 Filing 2272 DATATREASURY CORPORATION'S SEALED RESPONSE to SUNTRUST'S Motion re 1840 SEALED PATENT MOTION STRIKE PORTION OF THE EXPERT REPORT AND TESTIMONY OF MR. JOHN BILES filed by Datatreasury Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H)(Roach, Nelson)
August 3, 2010 Filing 2271 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 1837 Opposed SEALED MOTION TO LIMIT EXPERT TESTIMONY ON DIRECTION AND CONTROL filed by Keybank National Association, Keycorp, Suntrust Bank, Suntrust Banks, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Victoria L. Wicken, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11)(Baxter, Samuel)
August 3, 2010 Filing 2270 DataTreasury Corporation's SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 1836 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Christopher Bokhart filed by Datatreasury Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Roach, Nelson)
August 2, 2010 Filing 2269 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for DataTreasury Corporation's Responses to Defendants' Motions to Strike by Datatreasury Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Roach, Nelson)
July 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2268 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER FOR PHASE III TRIAL:( Final Pretrial Conference date TBD; Jury instructions due by 9/29/2010, Jury Selection set for 10/12/2010 in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge David Folsom., Proposed Pretrial Order due by 9/29/2010.),. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 7/27/10. (mrm, ) Modified on 7/27/2010 (mrm, ).
July 27, 2010 Filing 2267 SEALED MOTION to add The Clearing House and Viewpointe as Parties to the Phase III Trial by Datatreasury Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Roach, Nelson)
July 27, 2010 ***CORRECTION. Document # 2265 , Order. STATUS CONFERENCE IS NOT CANCELLED.*** (mrm, )
July 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2266 ORDER granting 2263 Motion to Lift Stay and Enter Docket Control Order. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 7/27/10. (mrm, )
July 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2265 ORDER re: 8/13/10 Status Conference; If one or more parties feel that the August 13, 2010 status conference is still necessary, such parties should notify the Court by letter no later than August 6, 2010, listing the topics such parties feel should be discussed. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 7/27/10. (mrm, ) Modified on 7/27/2010 (mrm, ).
July 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2264 SCHEDULING ORDER FOR PHASE III TRIAL: Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/4/2010 in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge David Folsom. Jury instructions due by 9/24/2010 Jury Selection set for 10/5/2010 in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge David Folsom. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 9/24/2010.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 7/27/10. (mrm, )
July 23, 2010 Filing 2263 Joint MOTION Lift Stay and Enter Agreed Docket Control Order for the Phase III Trial by Datatreasury Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Roach, Nelson) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/26/2010: # 3 Revised docket control order for phase III) (sm, ).
July 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2262 ORDER granting 2261 Motion to Dismiss Dfts BancorpSouth Bank and Bancorpsouth Inc with prejudice. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 7/21/2010. (sm, )
July 20, 2010 Filing 2261 Joint MOTION to Dismiss by Bancorp South Bank, Bancorpsouth, Inc., Datatreasury Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gray, Tonya)
July 19, 2010 Filing 2260 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on July 1, 2010, Post-Trial Motion Hearing before The Honorable Chief Judge David Folsom. Court Reporter: Libby Crawford, CSR, CVR, Telephone number: 903.794.4067 Ext. 237 or lcrawford@cableone.net. <P>NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov<P> Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 8/12/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/23/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/21/2010. (aec, )
July 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2259 ORDER GRANTING AGREED MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO FILE PHASE II PROPOSED PRETRIAL ORDER AND JURY INSTRUCTIONS, granting 2258 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Phase II Proposed Pretrial Order and Jury Instructions filed by Bancorpsouth, Inc., Datatreasury Corporation, Bancorp South Bank., ( Jury instructions due by 7/22/2010, Proposed Pretrial Order due by 7/22/2010.). Signed by Judge David Folsom on 7/16/10. (mrm, )
July 15, 2010 Filing 2258 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Phase II Proposed Pretrial Order and Jury Instructions by Bancorp South Bank, Bancorpsouth, Inc., Datatreasury Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gray, Tonya)
July 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2257 ORDER re: Phase III ( Status Conference reset for 8/13/2010 10:00 AM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before Judge David Folsom.). Signed by Judge David Folsom on 7/13/10. (mrm, )
July 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2256 ORDER; ORDERED that by July 23, 2010, at 1:00 P.M., the Phase II parties shall electronically file Notice(s), either jointly or independently, with estimates of the time required for the Phase II trial. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 7/13/10. (mrm, )
July 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2255 ORDER re: Phase III, ( Status Conference reset for 8/16/2010 02:00 PM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before Judge David Folsom.). Signed by Judge David Folsom on 7/13/10. (mrm, )
July 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2254 ORDER, re: Phase II ( Initial Pretrial Conference set for 7/26/2010 02:00 PM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before Judge David Folsom.). Signed by Judge David Folsom on 7/13/10. (mrm, ) Modified on 7/13/2010 (mrm, ).
July 8, 2010 Filing 2253 NOTICE of Compliance by Bancorp South Bank, Bancorpsouth, Inc. (Gray, Tonya) Modified on 7/9/2010 (sm, ).
July 8, 2010 Filing 2252 DATATREASURY CORPORATION'S SEALED SUR-REPLY to BANCORPSOUTH'S Motion re 2230 SEALED PATENT MOTION In Limine and to Exclude filed by Datatreasury Corporation. (Roach, Nelson)
July 8, 2010 Filing 2251 NOTICE by Datatreasury Corporation - (Notice of Compliance with the Court's Docket Control Order - DataTreasury Corporation's Objections to Defendants BancorpSouth, Inc. and BancorpSouth Bank's Amended Exhibit List) (Roach, Nelson)
July 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2250 ORDER, ( Status Conference as to Phase III set for 8/12/2010 02:00 PM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before Judge David Folsom.). Signed by Judge David Folsom on 7/7/10. (mrm, )
July 1, 2010 Filing 2249 SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 2230 (BancorpSouth Defendants' Reply in Support of Motion in Limine). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Gray, Tonya)
July 1, 2010 Filing 2248 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge David Folsom: Post Trial Motion Hearing held on 7/1/2010. (Court Reporter Libby Crawford.) (mrm, )
July 1, 2010 Filing 2247 DATATREASURY CORPORATION'S SEALED REPLY IN SUPPORT to Motion re 2228 DATATREASURY CORPORATION'S SEALED MOTION in Limine for the Phase II Trial filed by Datatreasury Corporation. (Roach, Nelson)
July 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2246 ORDER ; granting 2245 Motion to Withdraw 2178 Motion for Leave to file Rebuttal Expert Reports on Non-Infringing Alternatives; withdrawing 2178 Motion for Leave to file Rebuttal Expert Reports on Non-Infringing Alternatives,. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 6/30/10. (mrm, )
June 29, 2010 Filing 2245 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw 2178 Opposed MOTION Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Rebuttal Expert Reports on Non-Infringing Alternatives by Datatreasury Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Roach, Nelson)
June 29, 2010 ***FILED IN ERROR, A MOTION IS REQUIRED TO WITHDRAW A PLEADING. Document # 2243, Notice of Withdrawal. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (sm, )
June 28, 2010 Filing 2244 Plaintiff DataTreasury Corporation's Sealed Notice of Supplemental Authority in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law Regarding Release as a Matter of Judicial Estoppel (Filed as Docket #2125) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Roach, Nelson)
June 28, 2010 Filing 2243 ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE.***NOTICE by Datatreasury Corporation re 2178 Opposed MOTION Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Rebuttal Expert Reports on Non-Infringing Alternatives (DTC's Notice of Withdrawal of Motion - DKT. #2178) (Roach, Nelson) Modified on 6/29/2010 (sm, ).
June 28, 2010 Filing 2242 NOTICE by Datatreasury Corporation (DataTreasury Corporation's Notice of Compliance with Court's Docket Control Order - Service of Counter Page and Line Designations to BancorpSouth) (Roach, Nelson)
June 24, 2010 Filing 2241 DataTreasury Corpporation, Inc.'s SEALED RESPONSE to BancorpSouth's Motion in Limine re 2230 SEALED PATENT MOTION In Limine and to Exclude filed by Datatreasury Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Roach, Nelson)
June 24, 2010 Filing 2240 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 2228 SEALED MOTION in Limine for the Phase II Trial filed by Bancorp South Bank, Bancorpsouth, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gray, Tonya)
June 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2239 ORDER granting 2238 Motion for Page Limit Extension on its Response to Defendant BancorpSouths Motion in Limine and to Exclude. DataTreasurys page limit for its Response to Dkt. No. 2230 is accordingly increased from 15 pages up to and including 20 pages. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 6/24/10. (mrm, )
June 23, 2010 Filing 2238 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Response to Motion in Limine by Datatreasury Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wright, Andrew)
June 23, 2010 Filing 2237 NOTICE by Datatreasury Corporation (Notice of Service of Amended Pre-Trial Disclosures Including Amended Exhibit List, Amended Witness List and Amended Page & Line Designations (Roach, Nelson)
June 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2236 AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL, WITH PREJUDICE, granting 2234 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Defendants Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wachovia Corporation, and Wachovia Bank, N.A. with Prejudice filed by Datatreasury Corporation., Wachovia Bank, National Association, Wachovia Corporation, Wells Fargo & Company, and Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, terminated.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 6/21/10. (mrm, )
June 21, 2010 Filing 2235 NOTICE by Bancorp South Bank, Bancorpsouth, Inc. Counter-Designations to Plaintiff's Deposition Designations (Gray, Tonya)
June 18, 2010 Filing 2234 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Defendants Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wachovia Corporation, and Wachovia Bank, N.A. with Prejudice by Datatreasury Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Roach, Nelson)
June 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2233 ORDER granting 2229 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 6/18/10. (mrm, )
June 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2232 ORDER granting 2227 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages on its Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 6/18/10. (mrm, )
June 18, 2010 Filing 2231 DataTreasury's SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 2179 Opposed SEALED MOTION DataTreasury Corporation's Motion to Add Defendants Viewpointe Archive Services LLC and The Clearing House Payments Co. LLC as Parties to the Phase II Trial filed by Datatreasury Corporation. (Roach, Nelson)
June 17, 2010 Filing 2230 SEALED PATENT MOTION In Limine and to Exclude by Bancorp South Bank, Bancorpsouth, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gray, Tonya)
June 17, 2010 Filing 2229 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Bancorp South Bank, Bancorpsouth, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gray, Tonya)
June 17, 2010 Filing 2228 SEALED MOTION in Limine for the Phase II Trial by Datatreasury Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Roach, Nelson)
June 17, 2010 Filing 2227 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for its Motion in Limine by Datatreasury Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Roach, Nelson)
June 14, 2010 Filing 2226 SEALED BancorpSouth Defendants' Notice of Filing Exhibit List. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Gray, Tonya)
June 14, 2010 Filing 2225 NOTICE by Bancorp South Bank, Bancorpsouth, Inc. of Deposition Designations (Gray, Tonya)
June 14, 2010 Filing 2224 Witness List by Bancorp South Bank, Bancorpsouth, Inc.. (Gray, Tonya)
June 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2223 ORDER granting 2217 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages in its Surreply to Defendants' Motion to Exclude Testimony of Christopher J. Bokhart on Commercial Success. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 6/11/10. (mrm, )
June 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2222 ORDER granting 2216 Motion to Lift Stay as to the Randle Patents. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 6/11/10. (mrm, )
June 10, 2010 Filing 2221 RESPONSE in Opposition re 2179 Opposed SEALED MOTION DataTreasury Corporation's Motion to Add Defendants Viewpointe Archive Services LLC and The Clearing House Payments Co. LLC as Parties to the Phase II Trial filed by The Clearing House Payments Company, LLC, Viewpointe Archive Services, LLC. (Emerson, John)
June 10, 2010 Filing 2220 SEALED Sur-Reply to Plaintiff DataTreasury's Motion to Limit Expert Testimony on Direction and Control re 1837 Opposed SEALED MOTION TO LIMIT EXPERT TESTIMONY ON DIRECTION AND CONTROL filed by Bancorp South Bank, Bancorpsouth, Inc.. (Gray, Tonya)
June 10, 2010 Filing 2219 DATATREASURY CORPORATION'S SEALED SUR - REPLY to Defendants' Motion to Exclude Testimony of Christopher J. Bokhart on Commercial Success - re 1836 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Christopher Bokhart filed by Datatreasury Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Roach, Nelson)
June 10, 2010 Filing 2218 SEALED SUR-REPLY to DEFENDANT BANCORPSOUTH'S MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S EXPERT REPORTS - re 1843 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Strike Portions of Plaintiff's Expert Reports filed by Datatreasury Corporation. (Roach, Nelson)
June 10, 2010 Filing 2217 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Re - DataTreasury Corporation's Sur-Reply To Defendants' Motion (DKT, #1836) To Exclude Testimony of Christopher J. Bokhart on Commercial Success by Datatreasury Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(King, Richard)
June 10, 2010 Filing 2216 Unopposed MOTION To Lift Stay - Randle Patents by Datatreasury Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Text of Proposed Order)(Roach, Nelson)
June 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2215 ORDER granting 2212 Motion for Leave to Extend the Deadline for Filing Sur-Replies to the Motions to Strike Expert Testimony. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 6/9/10. (mrm, )
June 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2214 ORDER granting 2211 Motion to Extend Defendants' Deadline to File and Serve Pretrial Disclosures and Deposition Designations. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 6/9/10. (mrm, )
June 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2213 ORDER granting 2210 Motion to Extend Defendants' Deadline to File a Surreply to Plaintiff DataTreasury Corporations Motion to Limit Expert Testimony on Direction and Control. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 6/9/10. (mrm, )
June 8, 2010 Filing 2212 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Sur-Replies by Datatreasury Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Roach, Nelson)
June 8, 2010 Filing 2211 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File and Serve Pretrial Disclosures and Deposition Designations by Wachovia Bank, National Association, Wachovia Corporation, Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rankin, Weldon)
June 8, 2010 Filing 2210 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Surrpely by Wachovia Bank, National Association, Wachovia Corporation, Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Rankin, Weldon)
June 7, 2010 Filing 2209 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to DataTreasury Corporation's Notice of Compliance with the Court's Docket Control Order - Exhibit List - Main Document: 2208 Notice (Other). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - EXHIBIT LIST)(Roach, Nelson)
June 7, 2010 Filing 2208 NOTICE by Datatreasury Corporation Notice of Compliance with the Court's Docket Control Order (Roach, Nelson)
June 7, 2010 Filing 2207 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to DataTreasurys Notice of Compliance with the Court's Docket Control Order - Page & Line Designations - Main Document: 2206 Notice (Other). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - PAGE & LINE DESIGNATIONS)(Roach, Nelson)
June 7, 2010 Filing 2206 NOTICE by Datatreasury Corporation - Notice of Compliance with the Court's Docket Control Order (Roach, Nelson)
June 7, 2010 Filing 2205 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to DataTreasury Corporation's Notice of Compliance with the Court's Docket Control Order - Witness List - Main Document: 2204 Notice (Other). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - WITNESS LIST)(Roach, Nelson)
June 7, 2010 Filing 2204 NOTICE by Datatreasury Corporation - Notice of Compliance with the Court's Docket Control Order (Roach, Nelson)
June 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2203 ORDER granting 2190 Motion to Exceed Page Limits for Defendants' Reply inSupport of Motion to Strike Expert Testimony. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 6/7/10. (mrm, )
June 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2202 ORDER granting 2185 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 6/7/10. (mrm, )
June 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2201 ORDER granting 2184 Motion to Exceed Page Limits for its Reply in Support of Wachovia's Motion to Strike Portions of the Infringement Expert Report of Professor John Hiles. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 6/7/10. (mrm, )
June 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2200 ORDER granting 2183 Motion to Exceed Page Limits for Reply in Support of Phase II Defendants' Motion to Exclude Testimony of Plaintiff DataTreasury Corporation's Expert, Christopher J. Bokhart, on Commercial Success. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 6/7/10. (mrm, )
June 4, 2010 Filing 2199 SEALED SUR-REPLY to Response to Motion re 2125 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law That, as a Matter of Judicial Estoppel, They Have Been Released from Liability to Plaintiff DataTreasury for the Claims Tried in Phase I filed by Datatreasury Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Roach, Nelson)
June 4, 2010 Filing 2198 SEALED SUR-REPLY to Response to Motion re 2132 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law That the Asserted Claims Are Invalid as Anticipated filed by Datatreasury Corporation. (Roach, Nelson)
June 4, 2010 Filing 2197 SEALED SUR-REPLY to Response to Motion re 2130 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law of No Willful Infringement filed by Datatreasury Corporation. (Roach, Nelson)
June 4, 2010 Filing 2196 SEALED SUR-REPLY to REPLY TO Response to Motion re 2133 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law That the Asserted Claims Are Invalid as Obvious filed by Datatreasury Corporation. (Roach, Nelson)
June 4, 2010 Filing 2195 SEALED SUR-REPLY re 2127 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Enhanced Damages and "Exceptional Matter" Determination filed by U.S. Bank, National Association, Viewpointe Archive Services, LLC. (Feldhaus, John)
June 4, 2010 Filing 2194 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 2131 SEALED MOTION Renewed Joinder and Motion of TCH for Judgment as a Matter of Law and Brief in Support filed by Datatreasury Corporation. (Roach, Nelson)
June 4, 2010 Filing 2193 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 2129 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law of Non-Infringement filed by Datatreasury Corporation. (Roach, Nelson)
June 4, 2010 Filing 2192 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 2128 MOTION to Strike Defendants' Post-Trial Motion to Strike filed by Datatreasury Corporation. (Roach, Nelson)
June 4, 2010 Filing 2191 SEALED Sur-REPLY Motion re 2124 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Renewed Joinder and Motion of Viewpointe for Judgment as a Matter of Law and Brief in Support filed by Datatreasury Corporation. (Roach, Nelson)
June 3, 2010 Filing 2190 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Defendants' Reply in Support of Motion to Strike Expert Testimony by Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rankin, Weldon)
June 3, 2010 Filing 2189 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 1846 SEALED MOTION to Strike Expert Testimony filed by Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. (Rankin, Weldon)
June 3, 2010 Filing 2188 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 1836 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Christopher Bokhart, filed by Bancorp South Bank, Bancorpsouth, Inc., Wachovia Bank, National Association, Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. (Williams, E Danielle)
June 3, 2010 Filing 2187 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 1844 SEALED MOTION Motion to Strike Portions of the Infringement Expert Report of Mr. John Hiles, filed by Wachovia Bank, National Association. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Williams, E Danielle)
June 3, 2010 Filing 2186 SEALED PATENT REPLY re 1843 BancorpSouth Defendants' Reply in Support of Motion to Strike Portions of Plaintiff's Expert Report (Gray, Tonya)
June 3, 2010 Filing 2185 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Bancorp South Bank, Bancorpsouth, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gray, Tonya)
June 3, 2010 Filing 2184 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Strike Portions of the Infringement Expert Report of Mr. John Hiles [Dkt. 1844] by Wachovia Bank, National Association. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, E Danielle)
June 3, 2010 Filing 2183 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages For Reply Brief in Support of Phase II Defendants' Motion to Exclude Testimony of Christopher Bokhart on Commercial Success [Dkt. 1836] by Bancorp South Bank, Bancorpsouth, Inc., Wachovia Bank, National Association, Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, E Danielle)
June 3, 2010 Filing 2182 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 1837 Opposed SEALED MOTION TO LIMIT EXPERT TESTIMONY ON DIRECTION AND CONTROL filed by Datatreasury Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Roach, Nelson)
June 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2181 ORDER, ( Post Trial Motions Hearing reset for 7/1/2010 03:00 PM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before Judge David Folsom.) Each side will have a total of 40 minutes for oral argument as to all motions (for a total hearing length of 80 minutes). Signed by Judge David Folsom on 6/2/10. (mrm, )
June 2, 2010 Filing 2180 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document (Certificate of Authority): 2178 Opposed MOTION Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Rebuttal Expert Reports on Non-Infringing Alternatives. (Bruster, Anthony) Modified on 6/2/2010 (sm, ).
June 2, 2010 Filing 2179 Opposed SEALED MOTION DataTreasury Corporation's Motion to Add Defendants Viewpointe Archive Services LLC and The Clearing House Payments Co. LLC as Parties to the Phase II Trial by Datatreasury Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Roach, Nelson)
June 2, 2010 NOTICE FROM CLERK re 2178 Opposed MOTION Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Rebuttal Expert Reports on Non-Infringing Alternatives. Clerk has modified this entry to be a sealed document per request of filing atty. (sm, )
June 1, 2010 Filing 2178 SEALED Opposed MOTION Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Rebuttal Expert Reports on Non-Infringing Alternatives by Datatreasury Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Amd Dkt Ctrl Order, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Ugone Report, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Ugone Report, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Williams Report, # 5 Exhibit 5 - Williams Report, # 6 Text of Proposed Order)(Bruster, Anthony) Modified on 6/2/2010 (sm, ).
May 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2177 ORDER granting 2162 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 5/28/2010. (sm, )
May 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2176 ORDER granting 2161 Motion to lift stay and enter contested docket control order LIFTING the stay in this matter as to Phase II Dfts. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 5/28/2010. (sm, )
May 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2175 SCHEDULING ORDER for PHASE II Trial: Jury Selection set for 8/2/2010 10:00 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge David Folsom.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 5/28/2010. (sm, )
May 27, 2010 Filing 2174 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 2172 Sealed Response to Motion,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit J - PART 2, # 2 Exhibit K)(Roach, Nelson)
May 27, 2010 Filing 2173 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 2172 Sealed Response to Motion,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit I, # 2 Exhibit J - PART 1)(Roach, Nelson)
May 27, 2010 Filing 2172 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 1844 SEALED MOTION Motion to Strike Portions of the Infringement Expert Report of Mr. John Hiles filed by Datatreasury Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H)(Roach, Nelson)
May 27, 2010 Filing 2171 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 1836 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Christopher Bokhart filed by Datatreasury Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Roach, Nelson)
May 27, 2010 Filing 2170 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 2164 Sealed Response to Motion,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit K- PART 3, # 2 Exhibit L, # 3 Exhibit M, # 4 Exhibit N, # 5 Exhibit O)(Roach, Nelson)
May 27, 2010 Filing 2169 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 1837 Opposed SEALED MOTION TO LIMIT EXPERT TESTIMONY ON DIRECTION AND CONTROL filed by Bancorp South Bank, Bancorpsouth, Inc., Wachovia Bank, National Association, Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K)(Williams, E Danielle)
May 27, 2010 Filing 2168 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 2164 Sealed Response to Motion,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit K - PART 2)(Roach, Nelson)
May 27, 2010 Filing 2167 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 2164 Sealed Response to Motion,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit K - PART 1)(Roach, Nelson)
May 27, 2010 Filing 2166 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 2164 Sealed Response to Motion,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit I - PART 2, # 2 Exhibit J)(Roach, Nelson)
May 27, 2010 Filing 2165 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 2164 Sealed Response to Motion,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit F, # 2 Exhibit G, # 3 Exhibit H, # 4 Exhibit I - PART 1)(Roach, Nelson)
May 27, 2010 Filing 2164 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 1843 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Strike Portions of Plaintiff's Expert Reports filed by Datatreasury Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Roach, Nelson)
May 27, 2010 Filing 2163 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 1846 SEALED MOTION to Strike Expert Testimony filed by Datatreasury Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K)(Roach, Nelson)
May 27, 2010 Filing 2162 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Phase II Daubert Responses by Datatreasury Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Roach, Nelson)
May 24, 2010 Filing 2161 Joint MOTION To Lift Stay and Enter Contested Docket Control Order For The Phase II Trial by DataTreasury, Wells Fargo, Wachovia, and BancorpSouth by Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Defendants' Ex. A, # 2 Exhibit DTC's Ex. B, # 3 Text of Proposed Order Defendants' Proposed Docket Control Order, # 4 Text of Proposed Order DTC's Proposed Docket Control Order)(Rankin, Weldon)
May 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2160 ORDER granting 2150 Motion To Amend Briefing Limits and Schedule; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the deadline to file any sur-reply briefs is extended one week from May 28, 2010 to June 4, 2010 and each sur-reply brief not exceed 15 pages.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 5/20/10. (mrm, )
May 19, 2010 Filing 2159 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 2131 SEALED MOTION Renewed Joinder and Motion of TCH for Judgment as a Matter of Law and Brief in Support filed by The Clearing House Payments Company, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2)(McGee, Preston)
May 19, 2010 Filing 2158 REPLY to Response to Motion re 2132 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law That the Asserted Claims Are Invalid as Anticipated filed by The Clearing House Payments Company, LLC, U.S. Bank, National Association, Viewpointe Archive Services, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Feldhaus, John)
May 19, 2010 Filing 2157 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 2127 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Enhanced Damages and "Exceptional Matter" Determination filed by Datatreasury Corporation. (Roach, Nelson)
May 19, 2010 Filing 2156 REPLY to Response to Motion re 2124 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Renewed Joinder and Motion of Viewpointe for Judgment as a Matter of Law and Brief in Support filed by Viewpointe Archive Services, LLC. (Emerson, John)
May 19, 2010 Filing 2155 REPLY to Response to Motion re 2129 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law of Non-Infringement filed by The Clearing House Payments Company, LLC, U.S. Bank, National Association, Viewpointe Archive Services, LLC. (Feldhaus, John)
May 19, 2010 Filing 2154 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 2128 MOTION to Strike Defendants' Post-Trial Motion to Strike filed by The Clearing House Payments Company, LLC, U.S. Bank, National Association, Viewpointe Archive Services, LLC. (Feldhaus, John)
May 19, 2010 Filing 2153 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 2130 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law of No Willful Infringement filed by U.S. Bank, National Association. (Feldhaus, John)
May 19, 2010 Filing 2152 REPLY to Response to Motion re 2133 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law That the Asserted Claims Are Invalid as Obvious filed by The Clearing House Payments Company, LLC, U.S. Bank, National Association, Viewpointe Archive Services, LLC. (Feldhaus, John)
May 19, 2010 Filing 2151 REPLY to Response to Motion re 2125 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law That, as a Matter of Judicial Estoppel, They Have Been Released from Liability to Plaintiff DataTreasury for the Claims Tried in Phase I filed by The Clearing House Payments Company, LLC, U.S. Bank, National Association, Viewpointe Archive Services, LLC. (Redden, Joe)
May 19, 2010 Filing 2150 Joint MOTION To Amend Briefing Limits and Schedule by U.S. Bank, National Association. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Feldhaus, John)
May 7, 2010 Filing 2149 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 2148 Sealed Response to Motion,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit H, # 2 Exhibit I, # 3 Exhibit J, # 4 Exhibit K, # 5 Exhibit L, # 6 Exhibit M, # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Roach, Nelson)
May 7, 2010 Filing 2148 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 2125 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law That, as a Matter of Judicial Estoppel, They Have Been Released from Liability to Plaintiff DataTreasury for the Claims Tried in Phase I filed by Datatreasury Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Roach, Nelson)
May 7, 2010 Filing 2147 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 2132 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law That the Asserted Claims Are Invalid as Anticipated filed by Datatreasury Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6)(Roach, Nelson)
May 7, 2010 Filing 2146 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 2144 Sealed Response to Motion. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit M, # 2 Exhibit MM, # 3 Exhibit N, # 4 Exhibit NN, # 5 Exhibit O, # 6 Exhibit OO, # 7 Exhibit P, # 8 Exhibit PP, # 9 Exhibit Q, # 10 Exhibit QQ, # 11 Exhibit R, # 12 Exhibit RR, # 13 Exhibit S, # 14 Exhibit SS, # 15 Exhibit T, # 16 Exhibit U, # 17 Exhibit V, # 18 Exhibit W, # 19 Exhibit X, # 20 Exhibit Y, # 21 Exhibit Z, # 22 Roach Declaration)(Roach, Nelson)
May 7, 2010 Filing 2145 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 2144 Sealed Response to Motion. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B, # 2 Exhibit BB, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit C1, # 5 Exhibit CC, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit DD, # 8 Exhibit E, # 9 Exhibit EE, # 10 Exhibit F, # 11 Exhibit FF, # 12 Exhibit G, # 13 Exhibit GG, # 14 Exhibit H, # 15 Exhibit HH, # 16 Exhibit I, # 17 Exhibit II, # 18 Exhibit J, # 19 Exhibit JJ, # 20 Exhibit K, # 21 Exhibit KK, # 22 Exhibit L, # 23 Exhibit LL, # 24 Exhibit AA)(Roach, Nelson)
May 7, 2010 Filing 2144 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 2133 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law That the Asserted Claims Are Invalid as Obvious filed by Datatreasury Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Roach, Nelson)
May 7, 2010 Filing 2143 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 2129 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law of Non-Infringement filed by Datatreasury Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16)(Roach, Nelson)
May 7, 2010 Filing 2142 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 2130 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law of No Willful Infringement filed by Datatreasury Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T, # 21 Exhibit U, # 22 Exhibit V)(Roach, Nelson)
May 7, 2010 Filing 2141 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 2131 SEALED MOTION Renewed Joinder and Motion of TCH for Judgment as a Matter of Law and Brief in Support filed by Datatreasury Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Roach, Nelson)
May 7, 2010 Filing 2140 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 2128 MOTION to Strike Defendants' Post-Trial Motion to Strike filed by Datatreasury Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Roach, Nelson)
May 7, 2010 Filing 2139 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 2124 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Renewed Joinder and Motion of Viewpointe for Judgment as a Matter of Law and Brief in Support filed by Datatreasury Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11)(Roach, Nelson)
May 7, 2010 Filing 2138 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 2127 U.S. Bank's and Viewpointe's Opposition to DataTreasury's Request for Enhanced Damages and "Exceptional Matter" Determination filed by U.S. Bank, National Association, Viewpointe Archive Services, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit F)(Feldhaus, John)
May 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2137 ORDER granting 2136 Motion to Redact re 2105 Transcript, 2102 Transcript. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 5/6/10. (mrm, )
May 3, 2010 Filing 2136 Unopposed MOTION to Redact 2105 Transcript,,, 2102 Transcript,,, by BB&T Corporation, Branch Banking and Trust Company, Comerica Bank, Comerica Incorporated, M&T Bank, M&T Bank Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, E Danielle)
April 30, 2010 Filing 2135 NOTICE of Intent to Request Redaction by E Danielle Thompson Williams re 2105 Transcript,,, 2102 Transcript,,,. (Williams, E Danielle)
April 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2134 ORDER granting 2126 Motion for Page Limit Extension. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 4/29/10. (mrm, )
April 23, 2010 Filing 2133 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law That the Asserted Claims Are Invalid as Obvious by The Clearing House Payments Company, LLC, U.S. Bank, National Association, Viewpointe Archive Services, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Feldhaus, John)
April 23, 2010 Filing 2132 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law That the Asserted Claims Are Invalid as Anticipated by The Clearing House Payments Company, LLC, U.S. Bank, National Association, Viewpointe Archive Services, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Feldhaus, John)
April 23, 2010 Filing 2131 SEALED MOTION Renewed Joinder and Motion of TCH for Judgment as a Matter of Law and Brief in Support by The Clearing House Payments Company, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McGee, Preston)
April 23, 2010 Filing 2130 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law of No Willful Infringement by U.S. Bank, National Association. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Feldhaus, John)
April 23, 2010 Filing 2129 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law of Non-Infringement by The Clearing House Payments Company, LLC, U.S. Bank, National Association, Viewpointe Archive Services, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Keener, Jason)
April 23, 2010 Filing 2128 MOTION to Strike Defendants' Post-Trial Motion to Strike by The Clearing House Payments Company, LLC, U.S. Bank, National Association, Viewpointe Archive Services, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Feldhaus, John)
April 23, 2010 Filing 2127 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Enhanced Damages and "Exceptional Matter" Determination by Datatreasury Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Text of Proposed Order)(Roach, Nelson)
April 23, 2010 Filing 2126 Unopposed MOTION Extend Page Limits by Datatreasury Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Roach, Nelson)
April 23, 2010 Filing 2125 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law That, as a Matter of Judicial Estoppel, They Have Been Released from Liability to Plaintiff DataTreasury for the Claims Tried in Phase I by The Clearing House Payments Company, LLC, U.S. Bank, National Association, Viewpointe Archive Services, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Redden, Joe)
April 23, 2010 Filing 2124 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Renewed Joinder and Motion of Viewpointe for Judgment as a Matter of Law and Brief in Support by Viewpointe Archive Services, LLC. Responses due by 5/7/2010 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Philbin, Phillip)
April 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2123 CORRECTED ORDER; replacing 2122 Order; granting 2121 Joint MOTION Revise Hearing and Briefing Schedules filed by U.S. Bank, National Association, ( Post Trial Motions reset for 6/21/2010 01:30 PM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before Judge David Folsom.). Signed by Judge David Folsom on 4/20/10. (mrm, )
April 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2122 *SEE CORRECTED ORDER DKT # 2123 ORDER* ORDER, granting 2121 Joint MOTION Revise Hearing and Briefing Schedules filed by U.S. Bank, National Association., (Post Trial Motions reset for 6/21/2010 Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before Judge David Folsom.). Signed by Judge David Folsom on 4/20/10. (mrm, ) Modified on 4/20/2010 (mrm, ).
April 19, 2010 Filing 2121 Joint MOTION Revise Hearing and Briefing Schedules by U.S. Bank, National Association. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Feldhaus, John)
April 8, 2010 Filing 2118 PARTIAL JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW, U.S. Bancorp terminated.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 4/8/10. (mrm, )
April 7, 2010 Filing 2117 Joint MOTION To Set Briefing Schedule by Datatreasury Corporation, The Clearing House Payments Company, LLC, U.S. Bancorp, U.S. Bank, National Association, Viewpointe Archive Services, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Feldhaus, John)
April 7, 2010 Filing 2116 Joint MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law (Partial Judgment As A Matter Of Law) by Datatreasury Corporation, The Clearing House Payments Company, LLC, U.S. Bancorp, U.S. Bank, National Association, Viewpointe Archive Services, LLC. Responses due by 4/7/2010 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Feldhaus, John)
April 7, 2010 Filing 2115 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 3/26/10 Closing Arguments, Charge & Verdict before Judge David Folsom. Court Reporter/Transcriber: S. Simmons/ J. Werlinger,Telephone number: 903/935-3868. <P>NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov<P> Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 5/3/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/11/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/9/2010. (lss, )
April 7, 2010 Filing 2114 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 3/25/10 Afternoon Session before Judge David Folsom. Court Reporter/Transcriber: S. Simmons/ J. Werlinger,Telephone number: 903/935-3868. <P>NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov<P> Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 5/3/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/11/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/9/2010. (lss, )
April 7, 2010 Filing 2113 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 3/25/10 Morning Session before Judge David Folsom. Court Reporter/Transcriber: S. Simmons/ J. Werlinger,Telephone number: 903/935-3868. <P>NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov<P> Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 5/3/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/11/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/9/2010. (lss, )
April 7, 2010 Filing 2112 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 3/24/10 Afternoon Session before Judge David Folsom. Court Reporter/Transcriber: S. Simmons/ J. Werlinger,Telephone number: 903/935-3868. <P>NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov<P> Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 5/3/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/11/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/9/2010. (lss, )
April 7, 2010 Filing 2111 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 3/24/10 Morning Session before Judge David Folsom. Court Reporter/Transcriber: S. Simmons/J. Werlinger,Telephone number: 903/935-3868. <P>NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov<P> Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 5/3/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/11/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/9/2010. (lss, )
April 7, 2010 Filing 2110 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 3/23/10 Afternoon Session before Judge David Folsom. Court Reporter/Transcriber: S. Simmons/ J. Werlinger,Telephone number: 903/935-3868. <P>NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov<P> Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 5/3/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/11/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/9/2010. (lss, )
April 7, 2010 Filing 2109 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 3/23/10 Morning Session before Judge David Folsom. Court Reporter/Transcriber: S. Simmons/ J. Werlinger,Telephone number: 903/935-3868. <P>NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov<P> Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 5/3/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/11/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/9/2010. (lss, )
April 7, 2010 Filing 2108 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 3/22/10 Afternoon Session before Judge David Folsom. Court Reporter/Transcriber: S. Simmons/ J. Werlinger,Telephone number: 903/935-3868. <P>NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov<P> Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 5/3/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/11/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/9/2010. (lss, )
April 7, 2010 Filing 2107 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 3/22/10 Morning Session before Judge David Folsom. Court Reporter/Transcriber: S. Simmons/ J. Werlinger,Telephone number: 903/935-3868. <P>NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov<P> Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 5/3/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/11/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/9/2010. (lss, )
April 7, 2010 Filing 2106 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 3/19/10 Afternoon Session before Judge David Folsom. Court Reporter/Transcriber: S. Simmons/J. Werlinger,Telephone number: 903/935-3868. <P>NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov<P> Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 5/3/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/11/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/9/2010. (lss, )
April 7, 2010 Filing 2105 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 3/19/10 Morning Session before Judge David Folsom. Court Reporter/Transcriber: S. Simmons/ J. Werlinger,Telephone number: 903/935-3868. <P>NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov<P> Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 5/3/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/11/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/9/2010. (lss, )
April 7, 2010 Filing 2104 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 3/18/10 Afternoon Session before Judge David Folsom. Court Reporter/Transcriber: S. Simmons/J. Werlinger,Telephone number: 903/935-3868. <P>NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov<P> Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 5/3/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/11/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/9/2010. (lss, )
April 7, 2010 Filing 2103 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 3/18/10 Morning Session before Judge David Folsom. Court Reporter/Transcriber: S. Simmons/J. Werlinger,Telephone number: 903/935-3868. <P>NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov<P> Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 5/3/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/11/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/9/2010. (lss, )
April 7, 2010 Filing 2102 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 3/17/10 Afternoon Session before Judge David Folsom. Court Reporter/Transcriber: S. Simmons/ J. Werlinger,Telephone number: 903/935-3868. <P>NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov<P> Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 5/3/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/11/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/9/2010. (lss, )
April 7, 2010 Filing 2101 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 3/17/10 Morning Session before Judge David Folsom. Court Reporter/Transcriber: S. Simmons/ J. Werlinger,Telephone number: 903/935-3868. <P>NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov<P> Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 5/3/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/11/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/9/2010. (lss, )
April 7, 2010 Filing 2100 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 3/16/10 Afternoon Session before Judge David Folsom. Court Reporter/Transcriber: S Simmons/ J Werlinger,Telephone number: 903/935-3868. <P>NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov<P> Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 5/3/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/11/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/9/2010. (lss, )
April 7, 2010 Filing 2099 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 3/16/10 Morning Session before Judge David Folsom. Court Reporter/Transcriber: S Simmons/ S Holmes,Telephone number: 903/935-3868. <P>NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov<P> Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 5/3/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/11/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/9/2010. (lss, )
April 7, 2010 Filing 2098 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 3/15/10 Afternoon Session before Judge David Folsom. Court Reporter/Transcriber: S Simmons/S Holmes,Telephone number: 903/935-3868. <P>NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov<P> Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 5/3/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/11/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/9/2010. (lss, )
April 7, 2010 Filing 2097 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 3/15/10 Morning Session before Judge David Folsom. Court Reporter/Transcriber: S. Simmons/ S. Holmes,Telephone number: 903/935-3868. <P>NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov<P> Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 5/3/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/11/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/9/2010. (lss, )
April 7, 2010 Filing 2096 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 3/5/10 Jury Selection before Judge David Folsom. Court Reporter/Transcriber: S Simmons/S Holmes,Telephone number: 903/935-3868. <P>NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov<P> Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 5/3/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/11/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/9/2010. (lss, )
April 7, 2010 Filing 2095 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 3/16/10 Morning Evidentiary Hearing before Judge Chad Everingham. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Susan Simmons, CSR,Telephone number: 903/935-3868. <P>NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov<P> Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 5/3/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/11/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/9/2010. (lss, )
April 7, 2010 Filing 2094 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 3/15/10 Afternoon Evidentiary Hearing before Judge Judge Everingham. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Susan Simmons, CSR,Telephone number: 903/935-3868. <P>NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov<P> Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 5/3/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/11/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/9/2010. (lss, )
April 7, 2010 Filing 2093 Sealed Transcript on 3/26/20. (lss, )
April 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2092 ORDER granting 2091 Motion to Seal Document 2079 Offer of Proof on Testimony of Keith DeLucia ). Signed by Judge David Folsom on 4/1/10. (mrm, )
March 31, 2010 Filing 2091 Agreed MOTION to Seal Document 2079 Notice (Other) Offer of Proof on Testimony of Keith DeLucia by Viewpointe Archive Services, LLC. (Philbin, Phillip) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/31/2010: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (sm, ).
March 26, 2010 Filing 2090 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge David Folsom: Jury Trial held on 3/15/2010, Jury Trial completed on 3/26/2010. (Court Reporter Judy Werlinger.) (mrm, )
March 26, 2010 Filing 2089 JURY VERDICT. (redacted)(mrm, )
March 26, 2010 Filing 2088 Sealed Document. Jury Verdict (mrm, )
March 26, 2010 Filing 2087 SEALED Jury Notes. (Attachments: # 1 Jury Note, # 2 Jury Note, # 3 Instruction, # 4 Instruction, # 5 Jury Note, # 6 Jury Note)(mrm, )
March 26, 2010 Filing 2086 Proposed Jury Instructions by Datatreasury Corporation. (Chin, Edward)
March 26, 2010 Filing 2085 Exhibit List. (Attachments: # 1 DataTreasury Exhibit List, # 2 US Bank Exhibit List, # 3 Viewpointe Exhibit List, # 4 The Clearing House Exhibit List) (Exhibits sealed per Protective Order) (mrm, )
March 26, 2010 Filing 2084 Jury Trial Witness List. (mrm, )
March 26, 2010 Filing 2083 FINAL Jury Instructions. (mrm, )
March 26, 2010 Filing 2082 Limiting Instructions. (Limiting INstruction # 2) (Attachments: # 1 Limiting Instruction # 6)(mrm, )
March 26, 2010 Filing 2081 Preliminary Jury Instructions. (mrm, )
March 25, 2010 Filing 2080 Proposed Jury Instructions and Interrogatories by U.S. Bank, National Association, Viewpointe Archive Services, LLC. (Viewpointe Requested Instruction # 1, Divided Infringement) (Attachments: # 1 Viewpointe's Proposed Revised Interrogatory # 1, # 2 US Bank Requested Instruction # 1, # 3 US Bank Requested Instruction # 2)(mrm, )
March 25, 2010 Filing 2078 Sealed Notice by Viewpointe Archive Services, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Amended Exhibit List) (Sammi, Paramjeet)
March 25, 2010 Filing 2077 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law by U.S. Bancorp, U.S. Bank, National Association. (Feldhaus, John)
March 25, 2010 Filing 2076 SEALED MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law by Datatreasury Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Roach, Nelson)
March 25, 2010 Filing 2075 Joint SEALED MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law by The Clearing House Payments Company, LLC, Viewpointe Archive Services, LLC. (Emerson, John) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/25/2010: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (sm, ).
March 25, 2010 Filing 2074 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law That Claudio Ballard Is Not Entitled To Any Date Of Invention Before The Filing Dates Of His Patents by The Clearing House Payments Company, LLC. Responses due by 3/25/2010 (Belisle, Stephen) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/25/2010: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (sm, ).
March 24, 2010 Filing 2073 Exhibit List (Amended Trial Exhibit List) by U.S. Bancorp, U.S. Bank, National Association.. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A)(Feldhaus, John)
March 23, 2010 Filing 2072 SEALED Amended Trial Exhibit List of Defendant, The Clearing House Payments Company LLC. (Belisle, Stephen) Modified on 3/24/2010 (sm, ).
March 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2071 ORDER; Defendant's objection to Plaintiff's use of licenses as evidence of secondary consideration of non-obviousness is hereby OVERRULED. Plaintiff may use any previously admitted license agreement to rebut Defendant's claims of obviousness. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 3/23/10. (mrm, )
March 22, 2010 Filing 2070 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Bruce E Clark for The Clearing House Payments Company, LLC. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-1-5247) (ehs, )
March 21, 2010 Filing 2069 Exhibit List (DataTreasury Corporation's Amended Exhibit List) by Datatreasury Corporation.. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A-Amended Exhibit List)(Roach, Nelson)
March 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2068 ORDER re: hearsay objections. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 3/19/10. (mrm, )
March 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2067 ORDER granting 2049 Motion for Admission of Certain Exhibits,. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 3/19/10. (mrm, )
March 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2066 ORDER; Plaintiff's request for admission of the Chase and Bank One license agreements is hereby GRANTED. vacating in part 2052 Order,. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 3/19/10. (mrm, )
March 19, 2010 Filing 2065 NOTICE by U.S. Bank, National Association of Letter Brief (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Feldhaus, John)
March 19, 2010 ***FILED IN ERROR. DID NOT FILE A NOTICE AND ATTACH LETTER Document # 2062, Notice. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
March 19, 2010 Filing 2064 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 2056 DataTreasury Corporation's Sealed Letter Brief to Chief Judge David Folsom - CERTIFICATE OF AUTHORITY TO FILE UNDER SEAL,. (Roach, Nelson)
March 18, 2010 Filing 2063 Sealed Document. DataTreasury Corporation's Notice of Compliance wth Court's Order (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, Plaintiff's Brief # 2 Exhibit 2, Original Petition # 3 Exhibit 3 Settlement Agreements)(Roach, Nelson)
March 18, 2010 Filing 2062 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE.***NOTICE by U.S. Bank, National Association of Letter Brief (Feldhaus, John) Modified on 3/19/2010 (ch, ).
March 18, 2010 Filing 2061 NOTICE by Viewpointe Archive Services, LLC Brief in Opposition to Admission of Further Settlement Evidence (Emerson, John)
March 18, 2010 Filing 2060 Additional Attachments to Main Document: 2057 Notice (Other), Notice (Other).. (Emerson, John)
March 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2059 ORDER - The court clarifies its prior ruling on the admissibility of certain license agreements (Dkt. No. 2052). The court admits the Second Addendum to the Net Deposit agreement, subject to appropriate redactions. The defendants objections thereto are overruled. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 3/18/10. (ehs, )
March 17, 2010 Filing 2058 NOTICE by The Clearing House Payments Company, LLC, U.S. Bancorp, U.S. Bank, National Association, Viewpointe Archive Services, LLC of Defendants' 2nd Proposed Jury Verdict Form (Feldhaus, John) Modified on 3/18/2010 (sm, ).
March 17, 2010 Filing 2057 NOTICE by Viewpointe Archive Services, LLC Letter brief regarding privileged material (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Bank of America letter), # 2 Exhibit B (Viewpointe e-mail), # 3 Exhibit C (Protective Order), # 4 Exhibit D (DataTreasury letter))(Emerson, John)
March 17, 2010 Filing 2056 Sealed Document. Letter from Nelson J. Roach to Chief Judge David Folsom (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I)(Roach, Nelson)
March 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2055 ORDER of USCA Federal Circuit denying petition for a writ of mandamus Misc #930 (ehs, )
March 17, 2010 Filing 2054 Sealed Document. Viewpointe's Amended Exhibit List (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit List)(Emerson, John)
March 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2053 ORDER re: Defendants' objections to Plaintiff's deposition designations as to Dennis Alleman. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 3/16/10. (mrm, )
March 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2052 *VACATED IN PART PER ORDER # 2066 * ORDER - The defendants objections to the Affiliated Computer Services and ACS Image Solutions, NetDeposit, Bank One, J.P. Morgan Chase, Ingenico, NCR, and MagTek license agreements are sustained. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 3/16/10. (ehs, ) Modified on 3/19/2010 (mrm, ).
March 16, 2010 Filing 2051 Proposed Jury Instructions by The Clearing House Payments Company, LLC, U.S. Bancorp, U.S. Bank, National Association, Viewpointe Archive Services, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Verdict Form)(Feldhaus, John)
March 16, 2010 NOTICE of DEFICIENCY regarding the submitted by Viewpointe Archive Services, LLC. No signatures of atty; no certificate of autohrity to seal; no certificate of service. Correction should be made by 1 business day and refiled. (sm, )
March 16, 2010 Filing 2050 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham: Evidentiary Hearing held on 3/16/2010. (Jan Lockhart, ECRO.) (jml)
March 15, 2010 Filing 2049 MOTION Joint Motion for Admission of Certain Exhibits by Datatreasury Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Roach, Nelson)
March 15, 2010 Filing 2048 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT, PLEASE IGNORE.***Sealed Document. Amended Exhibit List by Viewpointe Archive Services, LLC. (Sammi, Paramjeet) Modified on 3/16/2010 (mjc, ).
March 15, 2010 Filing 2047 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham: Evidentiary Hearing held on 3/15/2010. (Court Reporter Jan Lockhart, ECRO.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney sign-in sheet) (jml)
March 15, 2010 ***FILED IN ERROR, THESE DOCUMENTS ARE NOT TO BE REFILED DUE TO PHV APPLICATION MUST BE GIVEN TO CLERK TO FILE. Document # 2044-2046, Notices. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (sm, )
March 15, 2010 NOTICE FROM CLERK re 2042 Exhibit List. This entry has been modified by clerk, per attys request, to be a sealed entry. (sm, )
March 15, 2010 Filing 2046 ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE.***NOTICE by The Clearing House Payments Company, LLC re 2044 Notice (Other), 2045 Notice (Other) Confidentiality Agreement (McGee, Preston) Modified on 3/15/2010 (sm, ).
March 15, 2010 Filing 2045 ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE.***NOTICE by The Clearing House Payments Company, LLC re 2044 Notice (Other) Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice (McGee, Preston) Modified on 3/15/2010 (sm, ).
March 15, 2010 Filing 2044 ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE.***NOTICE by The Clearing House Payments Company, LLC Attorney Appearance of Bruce E. Clark (McGee, Preston) Modified on 3/15/2010 (sm, ).
March 15, 2010 Filing 2043 NOTICE of Disclosure by The Clearing House Payments Company, LLC of Supplemental Expert Report of Cecil Quillen (McGee, Preston)
March 15, 2010 Filing 2042 SEALED Exhibit List Amended Trial by The Clearing House Payments Company, LLC.. (McGee, Preston) Modified on 3/15/2010 (sm, ).
March 14, 2010 Filing 2041 AMENDED Proposed Jury Instructions. (Roach, Nelson) Modified on 3/15/2010 (sm, ).
March 12, 2010 Filing 2040 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 2039 Notice (Other)Certificate of Authorization and Sealed Exhibit 1. (Bruster, Anthony) Modified on 3/15/2010 (sm, ).
March 12, 2010 Filing 2039 NOTICE by Datatreasury Corporation re 2035 Order Notice of Compliance re Dennis Alleman Deposition Designations (Bruster, Anthony)
March 12, 2010 Filing 2037 NOTICE by Viewpointe Archive Services, LLC, U.S. Bancorp, U.S. Bank, National Association, The Clearing House Payments Company, LLC re 2020 Order, (Feldhaus, John)
March 12, 2010 NOTICE of DEFICIENCY regarding the #2033 Notice submitted by Viewpointe Archive Services, LLC, Bancorp South Bank. No certificate of service was included. Correction should be made by 1 business day and refiled. (sm, )
March 12, 2010 Filing 2036 STIPULATION re Public Availability of Two Books U.S. Bank Seeks to Use for Invalidity by U.S. Bancorp, U.S. Bank, National Association, Datatreasury Corporation. (Feldhaus, John)
March 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2035 ORDER re dfts objections to pla deposition designations as to Dennis Alleman. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 3/12/2010. (sm, )
March 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2034 ORDER re courts website being shut down from 12:00 am on Saturday, March 13th through 5:00 pm Sunday March 14th. If parties need to file a motion or other papers during this time period partys counsel or to email a copy of pleading to courts law clerk. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 3/12/2010. (sm, )
March 12, 2010 Filing 2033 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT, PLEASE IGNORE.***NOTICE by Viewpointe Archive Services, LLC, U.S. Bancorp, U.S. Bank, National Association, The Clearing House Payments Company, LLC re 2020 Order, (Feldhaus, John) Modified on 3/12/2010 (sm, ).
March 12, 2010 Filing 2032 STIPULATION Concerning Evidentiary Use at Trial of Litigation-Related License Agreements by Datatreasury Corporation. (Roach, Nelson)
March 12, 2010 Filing 2031 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 2027 Response in Opposition to Motion, (CERTIFICATE OF AUTHORITY). (Bruster, Anthony)
March 12, 2010 NOTICE FROM CLERK re 2027 Response in Opposition to Motion. The attachment (exhibit) - only exhibit - has been modified by clerk, per atty's request and is now sealed. (sm, )
March 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2030 ORDER denying 2026 Emergency Motion for Leave to File a motion for reconsideration of order. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 3/12/2010. (sm, )
March 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2029 ORDER re dfts objections to pla deposition designations as to Virginia Lupoli. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 3/12/2010. (sm, )
March 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2028 ORDER denying 1960 Sealed Patent Renewed Motion for sum jgm (not filed under seal per law clerk). Signed by Judge David Folsom on 3/12/2010. (sm, )
March 11, 2010 Filing 2027 RESPONSE in Opposition re 2026 Emergency MOTION for Leave to File Motion For Reconsideration filed by Datatreasury Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 SEALED Exhibit 1 - Expert Report of Chris Bokhart, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Bruster, Anthony) Modified on 3/12/2010 (sm, ).
March 11, 2010 Filing 2026 Emergency MOTION for Leave to File Motion For Reconsideration by U.S. Bancorp, U.S. Bank, National Association. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A)(Feldhaus, John)
March 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2025 ORDER regarding dfts objections to plaintiffs deposition designations as to William Chenevich, Debra Coscia, Patrick McMonagle and Peg Bost.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 3/11/2010. (sm, )
March 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2023 ORDER ruling on objections regarding dfts objections to plaintiffs deposition counter designatinos as to Keith Delucia. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 3/11/2010. (sm, )
March 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2022 ORDER ruling on objections regarding deposition designations as to Tom Vicknair. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 3/11/2010. (sm, )
March 10, 2010 Filing 2021 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on March 4, 2010, Final Pretrial Hearing before The Honorable Chief Judge David Folsom. Court Reporter: Libby Crawford, CSR, Telephone number: 903.794.4067 Ext. 237 or lcrawford@cableone.net. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 4/5/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/13/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/11/2010. (aec, )
March 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2020 ORDER; re: Preliminary Jury Instructions; Ordered that comments on the Preliminary Jury Instructions, as well as on these limiting instructions or any additional proposed limiting instructions, should be submitted by letter to the undersigned, with a copy to opposing counsel, no later than Friday, March 12, 2010, at 12:00 P.M. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 3/10/10. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, Preliminary Jury Instructions)(mrm, )
March 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2019 ORDER; re: Defendants' objections to certain of Plaintiff's deposition designations as to Jerry Chambers and Tom Vicknair. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 3/10/10. (mrm, )
March 10, 2010 Filing 2018 USCA Case Number Misc No. 930 for A petition for writ of mandamus by The Clearing House Payments Co, LLC, US Bancorp, US Bank, National Association and Viewpointe Archive Services LLC
March 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2017 ORDER; re: Defendants' objections to Plaintiff's depositiondesignations as to Jerry Grundhofer and Irwin Kellner. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 3/10/10. (mrm, )
March 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2016 ORDER granting in part as modified and denying in part 2012 Motion to Compel Discovery. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 3/9/10. (mrm, )
March 9, 2010 Filing 2015 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings, Pretrial Hearing, held on March 8, 2010, before The Honorable Chief Judge David Folsom. Court Reporter: Libby Crawford, CSR, Telephone number: 903.794.4067 Ext. 237 or lcrawford@cableone.net. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 4/2/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/12/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/10/2010. (aec, )
March 9, 2010 Filing 2014 REPLY to Response to Motion re 2012 MOTION to Compel filed by Viewpointe Archive Services, LLC, U.S. Bancorp, The Clearing House Payments Company, LLC. (Feldhaus, John)
March 9, 2010 Filing 2013 DATATREASURY'S SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 2012 MOTION to Compel filed by Datatreasury Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Roach, Nelson)
March 9, 2010 Filing 2012 MOTION to Compel by Viewpointe Archive Services, LLC, U.S. Bancorp, The Clearing House Payments Company, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex 1, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Feldhaus, John)
March 9, 2010 NOTICE of DEFICIENCY regarding the #2011 Motion to compel submitted by Viewpointe Archive Services, LLC, U.S. Bank, National Association. No certificate of conference was included per local rules. Correction should be made and motion refiled, this motion is now terminated. (sm, )
March 8, 2010 Filing 2011 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT, PLEASE IGNORE.***MOTION to Compel by Viewpointe Archive Services, LLC, U.S. Bancorp, The Clearing House Payments Company, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex 1, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Feldhaus, John) Modified on 3/9/2010 (sm, ).
March 8, 2010 Filing 2010 Sealed Document. Defendants' Notice of Petition for Writ of Mandamus (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Feldhaus, John)
March 8, 2010 EXHIBIT (slides used at 3/8/10 hearing) by Datatreasury Corporation.. (mrm, )
March 8, 2010 Filing 2009 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge David Folsom: Hearing held on 3/8/2010. (Court Reporter Libby Crawford.) (mrm, )
March 5, 2010 Filing 2008 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge David Folsom: Jury Selection held on 3/5/2010. (Court Reporter Shelley Holmes.) (mrm, )
March 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2007 ORDER that plaintiffs objections to admissibility of the prior art offers for sale are hereby OVERRULED. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 3/4/2010. (sm, )
March 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2006 ORDER DENYING as to in limine item number 6 re 1876 SEALED PATENT MOTION (Defendants Omnibus Motion in Limine and to Exclude filed by Viewpointe Archive Services, LLC, The Clearing House Payments Company, LLC, U.S. Bank, National Association, First Horizon National Corporation, U.S. Bancorp, First Tennessee Bank, National Association ORDERING parties to confer regarding appropriate discovery and plaintiff is ORDERED to provide this discovery within 48 hours of this Order. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 3/4/2010. (sm, )
March 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2005 ORDER granting 1997 Motion to Dismiss Dfts BB&T Corporation and Branch Banking and Trust Company with prejudice. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 3/4/2010. (sm, )
March 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2004 ORDER finds that in limine item number 28 (and all related hearsay objections) should be GRANTED IN PART and CONDITIONNALLY DENIED IN PART.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 3/4/2010. (sm, )
March 4, 2010 Filing 2003 BRIEF filed Supplemental Authority re Admissibility of Prior Art by U.S. Bancorp, U.S. Bank, National Association. (Feldhaus, John)
March 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2002 ORDER; U.S. Bank's request to preclude use of the word "infringement" by Plaintiff's technical experts is hereby DENIED. To the extent U.S. Bank's briefing seeks leave to file a motion, such leave is hereby DENIED.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 3/4/10. (mrm, )
March 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2001 ORDER; Defendants' request to require Plaintiff to prove up standing during the March 2010 Phase I trial is hereby DENIED. Defendants' request to submit the question of standing to the jury in the Phase I trial is hereby DENIED. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 3/4/10. (mrm, )
March 4, 2010 Filing 2000 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of PRE-TRIAL HEARING held on 3/2/10 before Judge Chad Everingham. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR,Telephone number: (903) 663-5082. (52 pages)NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/29/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/7/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/7/2010. (tja, )
March 4, 2010 Filing 1999 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge David Folsom: Final Pretrial Conference held on 3/4/2010. (Court Reporter Libby Crawford.) (mrm, )
March 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1998 JOINT FINAL PRETRIAL ORDER,. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 3/3/10. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J)(mrm, )
March 3, 2010 Filing 1997 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss by Datatreasury Corporation, BB&T Corporation, Branch Banking and Trust Company. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, E Danielle)
March 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1995 ORDER regarding preadmittion of exhibits. The court declines to preadmit PX 1643, 1656, and 1657 in light of Chief Judge Folsomsorder on motions in limine. The plaintiff shall approach the bench before referring, directly orindirectly, to these matters in front of the jury. The balance of the objections to exhibits will beresolved by Chief Judge Folsoms disposition of the remaining motions in this case.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 3/3/10. (ehs, )
March 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1994 ORDER, granting 1986 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss filed by First Horizon National Corporation, First Tennessee Bank, National Association, Datatreasury Corporation., First Tennessee Bank, National Association; and First Horizon National Corporation terminated.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 3/3/10. (mrm, )
March 2, 2010 Filing 1996 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham: Evidentiary Hearing re Trial Exhibits held on 3/2/2010. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR.) (Attachments: # 1 Sign-in Sheet) (jml)
March 2, 2010 Filing 1993 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joe W Redden, Jr on behalf of U.S. Bancorp, U.S. Bank, National Association (Redden, Joe)
March 2, 2010 Filing 1992 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert David Daniel on behalf of U.S. Bancorp, U.S. Bank, National Association (Daniel, Robert)
March 1, 2010 Filing 1991 Sealed Document. Sur-Reply by Defendant, The Clearing House Payments Company, LLC, to DataTreasury's Reply Trial Brief on the Jurisdictional Issue of Standing (McGee, Preston)
February 26, 2010 Filing 1990 BRIEF filed Reply in Support of Defendants' Supplemental Brief in Support of Motions to Exclude Evidence of Litigation Induced License Agreements (Dkt. No. 1961) by Viewpointe Archive Services, LLC, U.S. Bancorp, U.S. Bank, National Association, The Clearing House Payments Company, LLC. (Feldhaus, John)
February 26, 2010 Filing 1989 Sealed Document. DataTreasury Corporation's Reply Brief in Support of Admissibility of Vicarious Admissions (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Roach, Nelson)
February 26, 2010 Filing 1988 BRIEF filed Reply in Support of its Motion to Prevent DTC's Expert From Opining That U.S. Bank Infringes Any of the Remaining Asserted Claims and Contingent Request for Leave to File Motion (Dkt. No. 1962) by U.S. Bancorp, U.S. Bank, National Association. (Feldhaus, John)
February 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1987 ORDER - The court has scheduled an exhibit hearing on March 1, 2010 at 1:30 p.m. In light of Chief Judge Folsoms orders on the motions in limine, the parties are directed to meet and confer in advance of the hearing to narrow the number of exhibits and objections that will be presented. The court will not pre-admit any exhibit if doing so would be inconsistent with an order granting a motion in limine. To facilitate the pre-admission process, the court suggests that the parties identify, through groupings or representative examples, common issues to be addressed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 2/26/10. (ehs, )
February 26, 2010 Filing 1986 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss by Datatreasury Corporation, First Horizon National Corporation, First Tennessee Bank, National Association. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Conley, Gerald)
February 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1985 ORDER denying 1839 Motion to limit testimony. Signed by Judge David Folsom on February 26, 2010. (rml, )
February 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1984 ORDER granting 1836 Sealed Motion to exclude testimony. Signed by Judge David Folsom on February 26, 2010. (rml, )
February 26, 2010 Filing 1983 DataTreasury Corporation's Sealed Reply Trial Brief on the Jurisdictional Issue of Standing - (DKT. #1956) (Roach, Nelson)
February 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1982 ORDER PROVISIONALLY granting 1838 Sealed Patent Motion; granting in Part 1873 Sealed Motion; granting in part and denying in part 1876 Sealed Patent Motion. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 2/26/2010. (sm, )
February 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1981 ORDER denying without prejudice 1843 Sealed Patent Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 2/26/2010. (sm, )
February 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1980 ORDER denying as MOOT 1837 Sealed Motion. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 2/26/2010. (sm, )
February 26, 2010 Filing 1979 DataTreasury Corporaton's Sealed Reply Trial Brief in Opposition to (DKT. #1959) - Admissibility of Certain Alleged Prior Art References. (Attachments: # 1 Roach Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 17, # 3 Exhibit 18, # 4 Exhibit 19)(Roach, Nelson)
February 26, 2010 Filing 1978 REPLY to Response to Motion re 1960 SEALED PATENT MOTION Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment filed by The Clearing House Payments Company, LLC. (Philbin, Phillip)
February 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1977 ORDER denying 1966 Motion for Leave to File Brief. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 2/25/2010. (sm, )
February 25, 2010 Filing 1976 RESPONSE in Opposition re 1960 SEALED PATENT MOTION Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment (Same Pleading as DKT. #1970 - Refiled Per Court) filed by Datatreasury Corporation. (Roach, Nelson)
February 24, 2010 Filing 1975 SEALED PATENT ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document (Declaration of Kimberly Dodd is contained in Main Document): 1974 Sealed Patent Response to Non-Motion. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Errata 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23)(Feldhaus, John) Modified on 2/25/2010 (sm, ).
February 24, 2010 Filing 1974 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE by U.S. Bancorp, U.S. Bank, National Association to 1959 Sealed Document,, filed by U.S. Bancorp, U.S. Bank, National Association. (Feldhaus, John)
February 24, 2010 Filing 1973 Sealed Document. - DataTreasury's Response to Defendants' Supplemental Brief in Support of Motions to Exclude Evidence of Litigation Induced License Agreements - DKT. #1961 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Roach, Nelson)
February 24, 2010 Filing 1972 Sealed Document.DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S BRIEF REGARDING "VICARIOUS ADMISSIONS" (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7)(McGee, Preston)
February 24, 2010 Filing 1971 TRIAL BRIEF DataTreasury's Response to U.S. Bank's Supplemental Brief on Divided Infringement and Untimely Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony - DKT. #1962 by Datatreasury Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Roach, Nelson)
February 24, 2010 Filing 1970 TRIAL BRIEF DataTreasury's Responsive Trial Brief to Viewpointe and The Clearing House's Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment - DKT - 1960 by Datatreasury Corporation. (Roach, Nelson)
February 24, 2010 Filing 1969 Sealed Document.REPLY BY DEFENDANT, THE CLEARING HOUSE PAYMENTS COMPANY, L.L.C., TO DATATREASURY'S TRIAL BRIEF ON THE JURISDICTIONAL ISSUE OF STANDING (McGee, Preston)
February 24, 2010 Filing 1968 RESPONSE in Opposition re 1966 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File BRIEF OBJECTING TO ADMISSION OF SETTLEMENT AGREEMENTS IN THIS CASE filed by Datatreasury Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Roach, Nelson)
February 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1967 ORDER reducing the time limit for voir dire to 30 minutes per side due to one of the four Phase 1 dft, First Tennessee, settling. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 2/24/2010. (sm, )
February 23, 2010 Filing 1966 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File BRIEF OBJECTING TO ADMISSION OF SETTLEMENT AGREEMENTS IN THIS CASE by Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America, National Association, Suntrust Banks, Inc., Suntrust Bank, Keycorp, Keybank National Association, Lasalle Bank Corporation, Lasalle Bank NA. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
February 23, 2010 Filing 1965 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT - Certificate of Authority to File Under Seal to Main Document: 1959 Sealed Document, Plaintiff's Trial Brief in Opposition to Admissibility of Certain Alleged Prior Art References. (Roach, Nelson)
February 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1964 ORDER, The Court hereby ORDERS that each side will have 22.5 hours for case presentation including direct examination, cross-examination, redirect, and rebuttal. This time limit does not include time related to jury selection, opening, closing, and transition statements. The Defendants shall share in their sides time. If the Defendants are unable to agree on how to divide their time, each Defendant shall be allocated one third of the Defendants' time.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 2/23/10. (mrm, )
February 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1963 ORDER granting 1958 Motion for Leave to File Defendants' Supplemental Brief in Support of Motions to Exclude Evidence of Litigation Induced License Agreements. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 2/23/10. (mrm, )
February 22, 2010 Filing 1962 BRIEF filed U.S. Bank's Supplemental Brief On Divided Infringement and Motion to Prevent DataTreasury's Expert From Opining That U.S. Bank Infringes Any of the Remaining Asserted Claims by U.S. Bancorp, U.S. Bank, National Association. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Feldhaus, John)
February 22, 2010 Filing 1961 BRIEF filed Defendants' Supplemental Brief in Support of Motions to Exclude Evidence of Litigation Induced License Agreements by The Clearing House Payments Company, LLC, Viewpointe Archive Services, LLC, U.S. Bancorp, U.S. Bank, National Association. (Feldhaus, John)
February 22, 2010 Filing 1960 SEALED PATENT MOTION Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment by Viewpointe Archive Services, LLC, The Clearing House Payments Company, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Bokhart depo excerpt)(Philbin, Phillip) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/23/2010: # 2 Text of Proposed Order) (sm, ).
February 22, 2010 Filing 1959 Sealed Document (Trial Brief in Opposition to admissibility of certain alleged prior art references)by pla Datatreasury. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Nelson Roach, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17)(Roach, Nelson) Modified on 2/23/2010 (sm, ).
February 22, 2010 Filing 1958 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Defendants' Supplemental Brief in Support of Motions to Exclude Evidence of Litigation Induced License Agreements by U.S. Bancorp, U.S. Bank, National Association. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Feldhaus, John)
February 22, 2010 Filing 1957 SEALED DataTreasury Corporation's Trial Brief in Support of the Admissibility of Evidence Related to the Defendants' Vicarious Admissions. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Arnoult Depo, # 2 Exhibit B - VP Capital Request, # 3 Exhibit C - Wysocki Decl, # 4 Exhibit D - Long Decl., # 5 Exhibit E - Christensen Depo, # 6 Exhibit F - Dabney Depo, # 7 Exhibit G - Jackson Depo, # 8 Exhibit H - Kline Depo, # 9 Exhibit I - Chambers Depo, # 10 Exhibit J - Ballantine Depo, # 11 Exhibit K - Joint Defense Chart, # 12 Exhibit L - VP Membership Agrmt, # 13 Exhibit M - TCH Site Visit to BofA, # 14 Exhibit N - VP Customer Service Agrmt - USB)(Roach, Nelson) Modified on 2/22/2010 (sm, ).
February 22, 2010 Filing 1956 TRIAL BRIEF DataTreasury's Trial Brief on the Jurisdictional Issue of Standing by Datatreasury Corporation. (Bruster, Anthony)
February 22, 2010 Filing 1955 NOTICE of Intent to Request Redaction by Anthony Kyle Bruster re 1953 Transcript,,,,. (Bruster, Anthony)
February 22, 2010 Filing 1954 NOTICE of Hearing: Hearing on pre-admission of exhibits set for 3/1/2010, 01:30 PM, in Mag Ctrm (Marshall) before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham.(delat)
February 22, 2010 Filing 1953 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 2-18-10, Initial Pretrial and Motions Hearing before The Honorable Chief Judge David Folsom. Court Reporter: Libby Crawford, CSR., Telephone number: 903.794.4067 Ext. 237 or lcrawford@cableone.net. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 3/18/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/29/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/26/2010. (aec, )
February 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1952 ORDER - Pursuant to the provisions of 28 U.S.C. §§ 636(b)(1) and (3) and the local rules for theassignment of duties to United States magistrate judges, the Court hereby REFERS exhibitobjections for the Phase I trial to the Honorable Charles Everingham IV for decision.IT IS. Signed by Judge David Folsom on February 19, 2010. (rml, )
February 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1951 ORDER granting 1947 Motion to Unseal Document 1940 Sealed Defendants' Proposed Jury Instructions, 1941 Sealed Defendants' Proposed Jury Verdict Form. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 2/18/10. (mrm, )
February 18, 2010 INITIAL PRETRIAL AND MOTION HEARING EXHIBIT. (Cts exhibit 1, deposition of Michael Trimarco and Plfs exhibit 1, US Bank, Image Exchange Review)(placed in Texarkana vault) (mrm, )
February 18, 2010 Filing 1950 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge David Folsom: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 2/18/2010, Motion Hearing held on 2/18/2010 re 1838 SEALED PATENT MOTION Viewpointe's Motion in Limine to Exclude JPMC Opinion of Counsel filed by Viewpointe Archive Services, LLC, 1843 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Strike Portions of Plaintiff's Expert Reports filed by First Tennessee Bank, National Association, Bancorp South Bank. (Court Reporter Libby Crawford.) (mrm, ) Modified on 2/19/2010 (mrm, ).
February 17, 2010 Filing 1949 NOTICE by Datatreasury Corporation (DataTreasury Corporation's Notice of Time Required for Trial (Bruster, Anthony)
February 17, 2010 Filing 1948 NOTICE by Viewpointe Archive Services, LLC, U.S. Bank, National Association, U.S. Bancorp, First Horizon National Corporation, First Tennessee Bank, National Association, The Clearing House Payments Company, LLC of Defendants' Estimate of Trial Time Needed for Phase I Trial (Feldhaus, John)
February 17, 2010 Filing 1947 Unopposed MOTION to Unseal Document 1940 Sealed Patent Document, 1941 Sealed Patent Document by Viewpointe Archive Services, LLC, U.S. Bancorp, U.S. Bank, National Association, First Horizon National Corporation, First Tennessee Bank, National Association, The Clearing House Payments Company, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Emerson, John) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/17/2010: # 2 Revised Order) (sm, ).
February 17, 2010 Filing 1946 RESPONSE to Motion re 1945 MOTION submit jury questionnaire filed by Datatreasury Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Email, # 2 Exhibit B - Defendants' Jury Questionnaire, # 3 Exhibit C - DTC's Proposed Jury Questionnaire, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Bruster, Anthony)
February 17, 2010 NOTICE FROM CLERK - regarding documents # 1940 and 1941, these have been re-sealed pending motion and order from attorney (ch, )
February 16, 2010 Filing 1945 MOTION submit jury questionnaire by Viewpointe Archive Services, LLC, U.S. Bancorp, U.S. Bank, National Association, First Horizon National Corporation, First Tennessee Bank, National Association, The Clearing House Payments Company, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Feldhaus, John)
February 16, 2010 NOTICE FROM CLERK - Document # 1941 was unsealed per attorney. (ch, )
February 16, 2010 NOTICE FROM CLERK - Document # 1940 was unsealed per attorney. (ch, )
February 16, 2010 Filing 1944 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on February 8, 2010, Motion Hearing, 19 pages before The Honorable Chief Judge David Folsom. Court Reporter: Libby Crawford, CSR, Telephone number: 903.794.4067 Ext. 237 or lcrawford@cableone.net. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 3/12/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/22/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/20/2010. (aec, )
February 15, 2010 Filing 1943 Proposed Pretrial Order Joint Final PreTrial Order by Datatreasury Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit J)(Roach, Nelson)
February 15, 2010 Filing 1942 Proposed Jury Instructions by Datatreasury Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit DataTreasury Corporation's Proposed Verdict Form)(Roach, Nelson)
February 15, 2010 Filing 1941 Defendants' Proposed Jury Verdict Form(Emerson, John) Modified on 2/16/2010 (ch, ). Modified on 2/17/2010 (ch, ). Modified on 2/18/2010 (mrm, ).
February 15, 2010 Filing 1940 Defendants' Proposed Jury Instructions(Emerson, John) Modified on 2/16/2010 (ch, ). Modified on 2/17/2010 (ch, ). Modified on 2/18/2010 (mrm, ).
February 12, 2010 Filing 1939 SEALED SUR-REPLY to Motion re 1876 SEALED PATENT MOTION (Defendants Omnibus Motion in Limine and to Exclude) filed by Datatreasury Corporation. (Roach, Nelson)
February 12, 2010 Filing 1938 SEALED SUR-REPLY to Motion re 1838 SEALED PATENT MOTION Viewpointe's Motion in Limine to Exclude JPMC Opinion of Counsel filed by Datatreasury Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-JPMC Prior Art)(Roach, Nelson)
February 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1937 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER; granting as modified 1824 SEALED MOTION : Motion for Clarification of the Court's November 13, 2009, Order and For In Camera Inspection filed by BB&T Corporation, Wachovia Bank, National Association, Wachovia Corporation, Branch Banking and Trust Company. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 2/12/10. (mrm, )
February 11, 2010 Filing 1936 NOTICE by Datatreasury Corporation re 1923 Order on Sealed Motion (DataTreasury Corporation's Notice of Compliance Giving Notice That it Has Submitted Exhibit 9 - Corrected for In Camera Review (Bruster, Anthony)
February 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1935 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion 1838 SEALED PATENT MOTION Viewpointe's Motion in Limine to Exclude JPMC Opinion of Counsel, 1843 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Strike Portions of Plaintiff's Expert Reports :( Motion Hearing set for 2/18/2010 10:00 AM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before Judge David Folsom.), ( Initial Pretrial Conference set for 2/18/2010 10:00 AM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before Judge David Folsom.). Signed by Judge David Folsom on 2/10/2010. (mrm, )
February 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1934 ORDER denying 1733 Sealed Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Indefiniteness; The Court's claim construction for Claim 42 of the '988 Patent is hereby SUPPLEMENTED to construe the term "said data processing system" to refer for antecedent basis to the "one or more remote data processing subsystems.". Signed by Judge David Folsom on 2/10/10. (mrm, )
February 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1933 ORDER denying 1732 Sealed Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 2/10/10. (mrm, )
February 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1932 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 1731 Sealed Motion for Summary Judgment of The Clearing House Payments Company LLC and Viewpointe Archive Services LLC. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 2/10/10. (mrm, ) Modified on 2/10/2010 (mrm, ).
February 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1931 ORDER granting 1898 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages in its Reply in Support of its Motion to Limit Expert Testimony on Direction and Control. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 2/9/10. (mrm, )
February 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1930 ORDER, granting 1897 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by U.S. Bank, National Association, U.S. Bancorp., Attorney Melvin R Wilcox, III terminated.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 2/9/10. (mrm, )
February 8, 2010 Filing 1929 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge David Folsom: Motion Hearing held on 2/8/2010 re 1731 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment of Viewpointe Archive Services LLC and The Clearing House Payments Company, LLC filed by The Clearing House Payments Company, LLC. (Court Reporter Libby Crawford.) (mrm, )
February 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1928 ORDER, The parties should be prepared to discuss outstanding motions, the Courts general voir dire procedure, time limits (including for voir dire, opening statements, and interim statements, if requested), the handling of exhibit and deposition designation objections, the Courts rules on exchange of demonstratives, the use of juror notebooks, and any other pressing issues. ( Initial Pretrial Conference set for 2/18/2010 10:00 AM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before Judge David Folsom.). Signed by Judge David Folsom on 2/8/10. (mrm, )
February 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1927 ORDER granting 1919 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 2/8/10. (mrm, )
February 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1926 ORDER granting 1918 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages in its Reply in Support of its Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 2/8/10. (mrm, )
February 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1925 ORDER granting 1913 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages in its Sur-Reply to Defendants Motion to Exclude Testimony of Christopher J. Bokhart on Commercial Success. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 2/8/2010. (mrm, )
February 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1924 ORDER granting 1910 Motion for Extension of EXPERT DISCOVERY DEADLINE. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 2/8/2010. (mrm, )
February 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1923 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 1824 Sealed Motion for Clarification of the Court's November 13, 2009 Order and for In Camera Inspection. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 2/8/2010. (mrm, )
February 4, 2010 Filing 1922 SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 1873 SEALED MOTION Plaintiff's Motion in Limine filed by Datatreasury Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exh.A - Freedman Depo., # 2 Exhibit Exh.B - Delucia Depo., # 3 Exhibit Exh.C - Trimarco Depo., # 4 Exhibit Exh.D - Wicker Report, # 5 Exhibit Exh.E - Hiles Depo.)(Roach, Nelson)
February 4, 2010 Filing 1921 SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 1838 SEALED PATENT MOTION Viewpointe's Motion in Limine to Exclude JPMC Opinion of Counsel filed by Viewpointe Archive Services, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Emerson, John)
February 4, 2010 Filing 1920 SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 1876 SEALED PATENT MOTION (Defendants Omnibus Motion in Limine and to Exclude) SEALED PATENT MOTION (Defendants Omnibus Motion in Limine and to Exclude) SEALED PATENT MOTION (Defendants Omnibus Motion in Limine and to Exclude) filed by First Horizon National Corporation, First Tennessee Bank, National Association, The Clearing House Payments Company, LLC, Viewpointe Archive Services, LLC, U.S. Bancorp, U.S. Bank, National Association. (Emerson, John)
February 4, 2010 Filing 1919 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Defendants' Reply ISO Omnibus MIL in Excess of Page Limits by Viewpointe Archive Services, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Emerson, John)
February 4, 2010 Filing 1918 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages DataTreasury's Unopposed Motion for Leave to Exceed the Page Limitations in its Reply in Support of its Motion In Limine by Datatreasury Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wright, Andrew)
February 3, 2010 Filing 1917 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 1837 Opposed SEALED MOTION TO LIMIT EXPERT TESTIMONY ON DIRECTION AND CONTROL filed by First Horizon National Corporation, First Tennessee Bank, National Association (Sur-Reply to Plaintiff's Motion to Limit Expert Testimony on Direction and Control). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Gray, Tonya)
February 3, 2010 Filing 1916 SEALED SUR-REPLY to First Tennessee Bank's (DKT. #1843) Motion to Strike Portions of Plaintiff's Expert Reports - filed by Datatreasury Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Roach, Nelson)
February 3, 2010 Filing 1915 SEALED SUR-REPLY to Viewpointe Archive Services, LLC's (DKT. #1839)Motion to Limit Testimony From Professor John Hiles and Dr. Hugh Smith - filed by Datatreasury Corporation. (Roach, Nelson)
February 3, 2010 Filing 1914 SEALED SUR-REPLY to Response to (DKT #1836)Motion To Exclude Testimony of Christopher J. Bokhart on Commercial Success filed by Datatreasury Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Roach, Nelson)
February 3, 2010 Filing 1913 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Re- DataTreasury Corporation's Sur-Reply to Defendants' Motion To Exclude Testimony of Christopher J. Bokhart - Commercial Success by Datatreasury Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(King, Richard)
February 2, 2010 Filing 1912 NOTICE by U.S. Bancorp, U.S. Bank, National Association re 1827 Sealed Document Notice of Objections to DataTreasury's Pretrial Disclosures (Objections to Exhibits) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit 1)(Feldhaus, John)
February 2, 2010 Filing 1911 NOTICE by U.S. Bancorp, U.S. Bank, National Association re 1826 Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other) Notice of Objections to Pretrial Disclosures (Objections to Deposition Designations and Counter-Designations) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit 1)(Feldhaus, John)
February 2, 2010 Filing 1910 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Motion to Extend Expert Discovery Deadline by Datatreasury Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chin, Edward)
February 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1909 ORDER granting 1904 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 2/1/2010. (mrm, )
February 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1908 ORDER granting 1902 Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limits for Defendants' Reply in Support of Motion to Exclude Testimony of Christopher J. Bokhart onCommercial Success. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 2/1/2010. (mrm, )
February 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1907 ORDER; ORDERED that, by Wednesday, February 17, 2010, at 5:00 p.m., the parties shall electronically file Notice(s), either jointly or independently, with estimates of the time required for the Phase I trial, excluding time related to jury selection, opening, closing, and transition statements. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 2/1/2010. (mrm, )
January 29, 2010 Filing 1906 REPLY to Response to Motion re 1839 MOTION to Limit Testimony from DataTreasury Experts Hiles and Smith filed by Viewpointe Archive Services, LLC. (Emerson, John)
January 29, 2010 Filing 1905 SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion filed by First Horizon National Corporation, First Tennessee Bank, National Association re 1843 First Tennessee Defendants Reply in Support of Motion to Strike Portions of Plaintiff's Expert Reports. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Gray, Tonya)
January 29, 2010 Filing 1904 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by First Horizon National Corporation, First Tennessee Bank, National Association. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gray, Tonya)
January 29, 2010 Filing 1903 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 1836 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Christopher Bokhart filed by U.S. Bancorp, U.S. Bank, National Association. (Feldhaus, John)
January 29, 2010 Filing 1902 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Reply in Support of Motion to Exclude Testimony of Christopher J. Bokhart on Commercial Success by U.S. Bancorp, U.S. Bank, National Association. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Feldhaus, John)
January 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1901 ORDER granting 1892 Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limits for Defendants Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion in Limine (Dkt. No. 1873). Signed by Judge David Folsom on 1/29/10. (ehs, )
January 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1900 ORDER granting 1891 Motion for Leave to Exceed the Page Limitation in its Response to Defendants Omnibus Motion in Limine.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 1/29/10. (ehs, )
January 29, 2010 Filing 1899 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion To Limit Expert Testimony on Direction and Control - re 1837 filed by Datatreasury Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Roach, Nelson)
January 29, 2010 Filing 1898 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Reply in Support of its Motion to Limit Expert Testimony on Direction and Control by Datatreasury Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bruster, Anthony)
January 29, 2010 ***FILED IN ERROR. ORDER WAS FILED AS SEPARATE DOCUMENT Document # 1895, Sealed Additional Attachments. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (CLERK ATTACHED ORDER TO DOC # 1894) (ch, )
January 29, 2010 Filing 1897 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by U.S. Bancorp, U.S. Bank, National Association. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wilcox, Melvin)
January 28, 2010 Filing 1896 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 1876 SEALED PATENT MOTION (Defendants Omnibus Motion in Limine and to Exclude) SEALED PATENT MOTION (Defendants Omnibus Motion in Limine and to Exclude) SEALED PATENT MOTION (Defendants Omnibus Motion in Limine and to Exclude) filed by Datatreasury Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T, # 21 Exhibit U, # 22 Exhibit V, # 23 Exhibit W, # 24 Exhibit X, # 25 Exhibit Y, # 26 Exhibit Z, # 27 Exhibit AA, # 28 Exhibit BB, # 29 Exhibit CC, # 30 Text of Proposed Order)(Roach, Nelson)
January 28, 2010 Filing 1895 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE.***SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 1894 Sealed Response to Motion,. (Roach, Nelson) Modified on 1/29/2010 (ch, ).
January 28, 2010 Filing 1894 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 1838 SEALED PATENT MOTION Viewpointe's Motion in Limine to Exclude JPMC Opinion of Counsel filed by Datatreasury Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Roach, Nelson) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/29/2010: # 6 Text of Proposed Order) (ch, ).
January 28, 2010 Filing 1893 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 1873 SEALED MOTION Plaintiff's Motion in Limine filed by Viewpointe Archive Services, LLC, U.S. Bank, National Association, U.S. Bancorp, First Horizon National Corporation, First Tennessee Bank, National Association, The Clearing House Payments Company, LLC. (Feldhaus, John)
January 28, 2010 Filing 1892 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Defendants Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion in Limine by Viewpointe Archive Services, LLC, U.S. Bank, National Association, U.S. Bancorp, First Horizon National Corporation, First Tennessee Bank, National Association, The Clearing House Payments Company, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Feldhaus, John)
January 28, 2010 Filing 1891 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in DataTreasury Corporation's Response to Defendants' Omnibus Motion in Limine by Datatreasury Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bruster, Anthony)
January 27, 2010 Filing 1890 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on January 13, 2010, Trial Plan and Motion Hearing before The Honorable Chief Judge David Folsom. Court Reporter: Libby Crawford, CSR, Telephone number: 903.794.4067 Ext 237 or lcrawford@cableone.net. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter Redaction Request due 2/22/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/2/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/30/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Sign-In Sheets 1-13-10)(aec, )
January 27, 2010 Filing 1889 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joe W Redden, Jr on behalf of U.S. Bancorp (Redden, Joe)
January 22, 2010 Filing 1887 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 1843 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Strike Portions of Plaintiff's Expert Reports filed by Datatreasury Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit R-2, # 20 Exhibit S, # 21 Exhibit T, # 22 Exhibit U, # 23 Exhibit V, # 24 Exhibit W, # 25 Exhibit X, # 26 Text of Proposed Order)(Roach, Nelson)
January 22, 2010 Filing 1886 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 1837 DEFENDANTS FIRST TENNESSEE BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AND FIRST HORIZON NATIONAL CORPORATIONS RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF DATATREASURYS MOTION TO LIMIT EXPERT TESTIMONY ON DIRECTION AND CONTROL (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Gray, Tonya)
January 22, 2010 Filing 1885 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 1839 MOTION to Limit Testimony from DataTreasury Experts Hiles and Smith filed by Datatreasury Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Text of Proposed Order)(Roach, Nelson)
January 22, 2010 Filing 1884 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 1836 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Christopher Bokhart filed by Datatreasury Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Text of Proposed Order)(Roach, Nelson)
January 22, 2010 Filing 1883 Unopposed SEALED MOTION for In Camera Review by Datatreasury Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 14, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Roach, Nelson)
January 22, 2010 Filing 1882 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 1824 SEALED MOTION : Motion for Clarification of the Court's November 13, 2009, Order and For In Camera Inspection filed by Datatreasury Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Roach, Nelson)
January 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1881 ORDER, granting 1877 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Defendant RBS Citizens, N.A. with Prejudice filed by Datatreasury Corporation., RBS Citizens, National Association terminated.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 1/22/2010. (mrm, )
January 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1880 ORDER granting 1875 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 1/22/2010. (mrm, )
January 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1879 ORDER granting 1874 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages in its Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 1/22/2010. (mrm, )
January 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1878 ORDER granting 1872 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 1/22/2010. (mrm, )
January 22, 2010 Filing 1877 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Defendant RBS Citizens, N.A. with Prejudice by Datatreasury Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Roach, Nelson)
January 21, 2010 Filing 1876 SEALED PATENT MOTION (Defendants Omnibus Motion in Limine and to Exclude) by Viewpointe Archive Services, LLC, U.S. Bancorp, U.S. Bank, National Association, First Horizon National Corporation, First Tennessee Bank, National Association, The Clearing House Payments Company, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Text of Proposed Order)(Gray, Tonya)
January 21, 2010 Filing 1875 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Viewpointe Archive Services, LLC, U.S. Bancorp, U.S. Bank, National Association, First Horizon National Corporation, First Tennessee Bank, National Association, The Clearing House Payments Company, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gray, Tonya)
January 21, 2010 Filing 1874 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Plaintiff's Motion in Limine by Datatreasury Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bruster, Anthony)
January 21, 2010 Filing 1873 SEALED MOTION Plaintiff's Motion in Limine by Datatreasury Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Roach, Nelson)
January 20, 2010 Filing 1872 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in its Responses to Trial Group Defendants' Motions to Strike by Datatreasury Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bruster, Anthony)
January 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1871 ORDER; The Court hereby CLARIFIES that the deadlines for filing motions in limine and for further briefing on pending motions to strike expert testimony are STAYED as to Defendants not involved in the Phase I trial. This stay of pretrial proceedings that are unrelated to the Phase I trial will enable the Court and the parties to better focus on finalizing issues pertinent to the Phase I trial. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 1/20/10. (mrm, )
January 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1870 ORDER re trial plan conference, ( Jury Selection setting Phase I for 3/5/2010 09:00 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge David Folsom., Pretrial Conference set for 2/18/2010 10:00 AM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before Judge David Folsom; final pretrial conference for Phase II will be held in Texarkana at a date and time to be determined and jury selection is set in Marshall for August 1, 2010 with trial commending immediately thereafter before Judge Folsom; As to Phase III pretrial is set in Marshall on 10/4/2010 and jury selection in Marshall for October 5, 2010; Pretrial proceedings are STAYED as to all dfts not set for trial in March 2010. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 1/19/2010. (sm, )
January 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1869 ORDER granting in part AS MODIFIED and denying in part 1517 Sealed Motion for leave to amend infringement contentions. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 1/19/2010. (sm, )
January 15, 2010 Filing 1868 NOTICE of Disclosure by BB&T Corporation, Branch Banking and Trust Company : Notice of Service of Pretrial Disclosures (Williams, E Danielle)
January 15, 2010 Filing 1867 NOTICE of Disclosure by Wachovia Corporation, Wachovia Bank, National Association : Notice of Service of Pretrial Disclosures (Williams, E Danielle)
January 15, 2010 Filing 1866 TRIAL Witness List by Suntrust Banks, Inc., Suntrust Bank, Keycorp, Keybank National Association. (Baxter, Samuel)
January 14, 2010 Filing 1865 NOTICE by Suntrust Banks, Inc., Suntrust Bank, Keycorp, Keybank National Association SUNTRUST BANKS, INC., SUNTRUST BANK, KEYCORP AND KEYBANK'S DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Baxter, Samuel)
January 14, 2010 Filing 1864 Sealed Document - Notice of Compliance with courts amended docket control order by Bank of America, Lasalle Bank Corp, Lasalle Bank NA and National Assn (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 Defendants Bank of America and LaSalle Bank's Rule 28(a)(3) Disclosures, # 2 Exhibit 1-A Deposition Designations, # 3 Exhibit B Trial Exhibit List)(Melsheimer, Thomas) Modified on 1/15/2010 (sm, ).
January 14, 2010 Filing 1863 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT SUNTRUST BANKS, INC., SUNTRUST BANK, KEYCORP AND KEYBANK'S TRIAL EXHBIT LIST (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Baxter, Samuel)
January 14, 2010 Filing 1862 First Tennessee Defendants' Notice of Filing Exhibit List (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-Trial Exhibit List)(Gray, Tonya)
January 14, 2010 Filing 1861 SEALED Defendants Wells Fargo & Company and Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.'s Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A, # 2 Appendix B)(Rankin, Weldon) Modified on 1/15/2010 (sm, ).
January 14, 2010 Filing 1860 BancorpSouth Defendants' Notice of Filing Exhibit List (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-Trial Exhibit List)(Gray, Tonya)
January 14, 2010 Filing 1859 NOTICE of Disclosure by Bancorpsouth, Inc., Bancorp South Bank (BancorpSouth Defendants' Deposition Designations) (Gray, Tonya)
January 14, 2010 Filing 1858 NOTICE of Disclosure by Bancorpsouth, Inc., Bancorp South Bank (BancorpSouth Defendants' Witness List) (Gray, Tonya)
January 14, 2010 Filing 1857 NOTICE of Disclosure by First Horizon National Corporation, First Tennessee Bank, National Association (First Tennessee Defendants' Deposition Designations) (Gray, Tonya)
January 14, 2010 Filing 1856 NOTICE of Disclosure by First Horizon National Corporation, First Tennessee Bank, National Association (First Tennessee Defendants' Witness List) (Gray, Tonya)
January 14, 2010 Filing 1855 NOTICE of Disclosure by Viewpointe Archive Services, LLC Viewpointe's Pretrial Disclosures (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Witness List), # 2 Exhibit B (Deposition Designations), # 3 Exhibit C (Exhibit List))(Emerson, John)
January 14, 2010 Filing 1854 SEALED Pre-Trial Disclosures of Defendant The Clearing House Payments Company L.L.C. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Exhibit and Witness List)(McGee, Preston) Modified on 1/15/2010 (sm, ).
January 14, 2010 Filing 1853 NOTICE of Disclosure by U.S. Bancorp, U.S. Bank, National Association U.S. Bank's Pretrial Disclosures - Exhibit List (Feldhaus, John)
January 14, 2010 Filing 1852 NOTICE of Disclosure by U.S. Bancorp, U.S. Bank, National Association U.S. Bank's Pretrial Disclosures - Deposition Designations (Feldhaus, John)
January 14, 2010 Filing 1851 NOTICE of Disclosure by U.S. Bancorp, U.S. Bank, National Association U.S. Bank's Pretrial Disclosures - Witness List (Feldhaus, John)
January 13, 2010 Filing 1850 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge David Folsom: Trial Plan Hearing held on 1/13/2010, Motion Hearing held on 1/13/2010 re 1517 Opposed SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS AS TO VIEWPOINTE ARCHIVE SERVICES, LLC filed by Datatreasury Corporation. (Court Reporter Libby Crawford.) (mrm, )
January 12, 2010 Filing 1849 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Wachovia Corporation, Wachovia Bank, National Association (Williams, E Danielle)
January 12, 2010 Filing 1848 SEALED PATENT ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 1839 MOTION to Limit Testimony from DataTreasury Experts Hiles and Smith. (Emerson, John)
January 12, 2010 ***FILED IN ERROR, WRONG EVENT USED, ATTY MUST REFILE USING CORRECT EVENT. Document # 1841, Sealed Document. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (sm, )
January 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1847 ORDER, ( Trial Plan Conference set for 1/13/2010 01:00 PM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before Judge David Folsom.) Each side will be limited to a total of 20 minutes to both present their respective trial plan(s) and to respond to the opposing side's trial plan(s).. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 1/12/10. (mrm, )
January 11, 2010 Filing 1846 SEALED MOTION to Strike Expert Testimony by Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Text of Proposed Order)(Rankin, Weldon)
January 11, 2010 Filing 1845 SEALED MOTION Motion to Strike Portions of Expert Reports of Dr. Hugh Smith by BB&T Corporation, Branch Banking and Trust Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B-1, # 3 Exhibit B-2, # 4 Exhibit B-3, # 5 Exhibit B-4, # 6 Exhibit B-5, # 7 Exhibit B-6, # 8 Exhibit B-7, # 9 Exhibit B-8, # 10 Exhibit B-9, # 11 Exhibit B-10, # 12 Exhibit B-11, # 13 Exhibit C, # 14 Exhibit D, # 15 Exhibit E, # 16 Exhibit F, # 17 Exhibit G, # 18 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, E Danielle)
January 11, 2010 Filing 1844 SEALED MOTION Motion to Strike Portions of the Infringement Expert Report of Mr. John Hiles by Wachovia Corporation, Wachovia Bank, National Association. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A part 1, # 2 Exhibit A part 2, # 3 Exhibit B part 1, # 4 Exhibit B part 2, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G, # 10 Exhibit H, # 11 Exhibit I, # 12 Exhibit J, # 13 Exhibit K, # 14 Exhibit L, # 15 Exhibit M, # 16 Exhibit N, # 17 Exhibit O, # 18 Exhibit P, # 19 Exhibit Q, # 20 Exhibit R, # 21 Exhibit S, # 22 Exhibit T, # 23 Exhibit U, # 24 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, E Danielle)
January 11, 2010 Filing 1843 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Strike Portions of Plaintiff's Expert Reports by Bancorp South Bank, First Tennessee Bank, National Association. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Conley, Gerald)
January 11, 2010 Filing 1842 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE EXPERT REPORTS AND TESTIMONY OF DR. HUGH SMITH by Keycorp, Keybank National Association. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Geoffrey L. Smith, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit N, # 16 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
January 11, 2010 Filing 1841 ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE.***SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT. (Emerson, John) Modified on 1/12/2010 (sm, ).
January 11, 2010 Filing 1840 SEALED PATENT MOTION STRIKE PORTION OF THE EXPERT REPORT AND TESTIMONY OF MR. JOHN BILES by Suntrust Banks, Inc., Suntrust Bank. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Geoffrey L. Smith, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
January 11, 2010 Filing 1839 MOTION to Limit Testimony from DataTreasury Experts Hiles and Smith by Viewpointe Archive Services, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Emerson, John)
January 11, 2010 Filing 1838 SEALED PATENT MOTION Viewpointe's Motion in Limine to Exclude JPMC Opinion of Counsel by Viewpointe Archive Services, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Emerson, John) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/12/2010: # 2 REVISED ORDER) (sm, ).
January 11, 2010 Filing 1837 Opposed SEALED MOTION TO LIMIT EXPERT TESTIMONY ON DIRECTION AND CONTROL by Datatreasury Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Roach Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit N, # 16 Exhibit O, # 17 Exhibit P, # 18 Exhibit Q, # 19 Exhibit R, # 20 Exhibit S, # 21 Exhibit T, # 22 Exhibit U, # 23 Exhibit V, # 24 Exhibit W, # 25 Exhibit X, # 26 Exhibit Y, # 27 Exhibit Z, # 28 Text of Proposed Order)(Roach, Nelson)
January 11, 2010 Filing 1836 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Christopher Bokhart by U.S. Bancorp, U.S. Bank, National Association. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration of John J. Feldhaus, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6, # 9 Exhibit 7, # 10 Exhibit 8, # 11 Exhibit 9, # 12 Exhibit 10, # 13 Exhibit 11, # 14 Exhibit 12, # 15 Exhibit 13)(Feldhaus, John)
January 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1835 ORDER granting 1828 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. The expert-discovery deadline, which currently expires on January 8, 2010, shall be extended to and including January 21, 2010, for the limited purpose of permitting Wells Fargo to resume and complete the deposition of DTCs expert John E. Hiles that was begun on Wednesday, December 9, 2009. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 1/11/09. (ehs, )
January 11, 2010 Filing 1834 NOTICE by U.S. Bancorp, U.S. Bank, National Association of Trial Plan Filing (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Trial Plan)(Feldhaus, John)
January 11, 2010 Filing 1833 NOTICE by Viewpointe Archive Services, LLC, The Clearing House Payments Company, LLC of Proposed Trial Plan (Sammi, Paramjeet)
January 11, 2010 Filing 1832 NOTICE by Datatreasury Corporation "Notice of Compliance" (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Proposed Trial Plan)(Roach, Nelson)
January 11, 2010 Filing 1831 NOTICE by Bancorpsouth, Inc., Bancorp South Bank Proposed Trial Plan (Gray, Tonya)
January 11, 2010 Filing 1830 NOTICE by Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association Wells Fargo, Wachovia, BB&T and First Tennessee's Proposed Trial Plan (Rankin, Weldon)
January 11, 2010 Filing 1829 Sealed Document - Bank of America, LaSalle, SunTrust, and KeyBank's Proposed Trial Plan (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Melsheimer, Thomas)
January 8, 2010 Filing 1828 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery JOINT MOTION TO EXTEND EXPERT DISCOVERY DEADLINE by Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Rankin, Weldon)
January 7, 2010 Filing 1827 DataTreasury Corpoation's Sealed Notice of Compliance with the Courts Docket Control Order - Exhibit 1- Exhibit List (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-Exhibit List)(Roach, Nelson)
January 7, 2010 Filing 1826 NOTICE by Datatreasury Corporation (Notice of Compliance with the Court's Docket Control Order) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - 3rd Party - Page & Line, # 2 Exhibit 2 - BB&T - Page & Line, # 3 Exhibit 3 - BOA - Page & Line, # 4 Exhibit 4 - BancorpSouth - Page & Line, # 5 Exhibit 5 - DTC - Page & Line, # 6 Exhibit 6 - First Tennessee - Page & Line, # 7 Exhibit 7 - Keybank - Page & Line, # 8 Exhibit 8 - LaSalle - Page & Line, # 9 Exhibit 9 - SunTrust - Page & Line, # 10 Exhibit 10 - TCH - Page & Line, # 11 Exhibit 11 - U, # 12 Exhibit 12 - Viewpointe - Page & Line, # 13 Exhibit 13 - Wachovia - Page & Line, # 14 Exhibit 14 - Wells Fargo - Page & Line)(Roach, Nelson)
January 7, 2010 Filing 1825 NOTICE by Datatreasury Corporation (Notice of Compliance with the Court's Docket Control Order) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Witness List)(Roach, Nelson)
January 7, 2010 Filing 1824 SEALED MOTION : Motion for Clarification of the Court's November 13, 2009, Order and For In Camera Inspection by Wachovia Corporation, Wachovia Bank, National Association, BB&T Corporation, Branch Banking and Trust Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, E Danielle)
January 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1823 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion 1731 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment of Viewpointe Archive Services LLC and The Clearing House Payments Company, LLC : Motion Hearing set for 2/8/2010 01:03 PM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before Judge David Folsom. Each side will have 20 minutes for oral argument. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 1/7/10. (mrm, )
January 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1822 ORDER re: 1764 Sealed DATATREASURY CORPORATION'S SEALED NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH COURT'S MOTION PRACTICE ORDER. 1765 Sealed DATATREASURY CORPORATION'S SEALED NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH THE COURT'S MOTION PRACTICE ORDER. (REPLACES DOCUMENT #1763). Signed by Judge David Folsom on 1/7/2010. (mrm, )
January 7, 2010 Filing 1821 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert Marc Manley on behalf of Suntrust Banks, Inc., Suntrust Bank, Keycorp, Keybank National Association (Manley, Robert)
January 6, 2010 Filing 1820 DATATREASURY CORPORATION'S SEALED SUR-REPLY to DEFENDANTS' REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON INDEFINITENESS re 1733 SEALED MOTION filed by Datatreasury Corporation. (Roach, Nelson)
January 6, 2010 Filing 1819 DATATREASURY CORPORATION'S SEALED SUR-REPLY IN OPPOSITION to DEFENDANTS THE CLEARING HOUSE PAYMENTS COMPANY, LLC and VIEWPOINTE ARCHIVE SERVICES' Response to SEALED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT - re 1731 C filed by Datatreasury Corporation. (Roach, Nelson)
January 6, 2010 Filing 1818 DATATREASURY CORPORATION'S SEALED SUR-REPLY IN OPPOSITION to DEFENDANTS' SEALED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON INFRINGEMENT - re 1732 filed by Datatreasury Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 2nd Declaration of Nelson J. Roach-NON INFRINGEMENT # 2 Exhibit PPP)(Roach, Nelson)
January 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1817 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion 1517 Opposed SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS AS TO VIEWPOINTE ARCHIVE SERVICES, LLC : Motion Hearing set for 1/13/2010 01:00 PM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before Judge David Folsom. Each side will have 15 minutes for oral argument. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 1/5/2010. (mrm, )
January 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1816 ORDER granting 1809 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 1/5/10. (mrm, )
January 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1815 ORDER, ( Trial Plan Conference reset for 1/13/2010 01:00 PM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before Judge David Folsom.). Signed by Judge David Folsom on 1/4/2010. (mrm, )
December 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1814 ORDER denying 1442 Sealed Motion to disqualify; denying 1570 Sealed Motion to strike declarations. Signed by Judge David Folsom on December 30, 2009. (rml, )
December 30, 2009 Filing 1813 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 1812 DATATREASURY CORPORATION'S NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH THE COURT'S MOTION PRACTICE ORDER- Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Roach, Nelson)
December 30, 2009 Filing 1812 NOTICE by Datatreasury Corporation re 1400 Order DATATREASURY CORPORATION'S NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH THE COURT'S MOTION PRACTICE ORDER (Roach, Nelson)
December 30, 2009 Filing 1811 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 1810 - DATATREASURY CORPORATION'S NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH COURT'S MOTION PRACTICE ORDER (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Roach, Nelson)
December 30, 2009 Filing 1810 NOTICE by Datatreasury Corporation re 1400 Order DATATREASURY CORPORATION'S NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH THE COURT'S MOTION PRACTICE ORDER (Roach, Nelson)
December 29, 2009 Filing 1809 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Viewpointe Archive Services, LLC, The Clearing House Payments Company, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Order)(McGee, Preston)
December 28, 2009 Filing 1808 SEALED REPLY to Response to 1731 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment of Viewpointe Archive Services LLC and The Clearing House Payments Company, LLC filed by The Clearing House Payments Company, LLC and Viewpointe Archive Services, LLC Attachments: (1)TCH Reply Statement of Facts, (2)Viewpointe Reply Statement of Facts, (3)Supplemental Declaration of Preston McGee, (4)Exhibit # 1 A, (5)Exhibit # 2 A, (6)Exhibit # 3 A, (7)Exhibit # 4 A(McGee, Preston)
December 28, 2009 Filing 1807 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 1733 SEALED MOTION Moving Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Indefiniteness filed by Viewpointe Archive Services, LLC, Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, U.S. Bancorp, U.S. Bank, National Association, Wachovia Corporation, Wachovia Bank, National Association, Suntrust Banks, Inc., Suntrust Bank, BB&T Corporation, Branch Banking and Trust Company, Bancorpsouth, Inc., First Horizon National Corporation, First Tennessee Bank, National Association, Bancorp South Bank, Keycorp, Keybank National Association, The Clearing House Payments Company, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B)(Williams, E Danielle)
December 28, 2009 Filing 1806 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 1732 SEALED MOTION For Summary Judgement of Non-Infringement filed by Wachovia Bank, National Association, Suntrust Banks, Inc., Suntrust Bank, BB&T Corporation, Branch Banking and Trust Company, Keycorp, Keybank National Association. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit I, # 2 Exhibit J, # 3 Exhibit K, # 4 Exhibit L, # 5 Exhibit M, # 6 Exhibit N)(Williams, E Danielle)
December 28, 2009 Filing 1805 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney James Y Pak for Viewpointe Archive Services, LLC. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-1-5108) (ehs, )
December 23, 2009 Filing 1804 Sealed Document. Notice of Compliance with Court's Motion Practice Orders: Defendants BB&T Corporation and Branch Banking and Trust Company, Keycorp and Keybank National Association, SunTrust Bank and SunTrust Banks, Inc., Viewpointe Archive Services, Wachovia Corporation and Wachovia Bank, National Association, and Wells Fargo & Company and Wells Fargo Bank, National Association's Response to Dkt. 1765 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Williams, E Danielle)
December 23, 2009 Filing 1803 Sealed Document. Notice of Compliance with Court's Motion Practice Orders: BB&T Response to Dkt. 1764. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Williams, E Danielle)
December 23, 2009 Filing 1802 Sealed Document. Notice of Compliance with Court's Motion Practice Orders: Wachovia's Response to Dkt. 1764. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Williams, E Danielle)
December 23, 2009 Filing 1801 Sealed Document - Notice of Compliance with Court's Motion Practice Order filed by Defendants Bank of America Corporation; Bank of America N.A.; LaSalle Bank Corporation; LaSalle Bank, N.A.; and RBS Citizens, N.A. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit 1)(Melsheimer, Thomas)
December 23, 2009 Filing 1800 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT Notice of Compliance with Court's Motion Practice Order by Defendants BancorpSouth Bank, BancorpSouth, Inc., First Tennessee Bank National Association and First Horizon National Corporation (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Gray, Tonya)
December 23, 2009 Filing 1799 Wells Fargo's Sealed Notice of Compliance with Court's Motion Practice Order and Exhibit 1. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Rankin, Weldon)
December 23, 2009 Filing 1798 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT. Notice of Compliance with Court't Motion Practice Order (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Gray, Tonya) Modified on 12/28/2009 (ch, ).
December 23, 2009 Filing 1797 NOTICE by U.S. Bancorp, U.S. Bank, National Association re 1765 Sealed Document Notice of Compliance With the Court's Motion Practice Order (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Peterson, Liane)
December 23, 2009 Filing 1796 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT.NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH COURT'S MOTION PRACTICE ORDER (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Baxter, Samuel)
December 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1795 ORDER granting 1705 Notice (Other) filed by Viewpointe Archive Services, LLC,granting 1710 Sealed Patent Document, denying 1707 Sealed Additional Attachments to Main Document, denying 1695 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) filed by RBS Citizens, National Association, Comerica Bank, BB&T Corporation, The Clearing House Payments Company, LLC, Branch Banking and Trust Company, Comerica Incorporated, Viewpointe Archive Services, LLC, U.S. Bank, National Association, U.S. Bancorp, granting 1696 Sealed Additional Attachments to Main Document, granting 1709 Sealed Patent Document, granting 1702 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) filed by Bancorpsouth, Inc., First Horizon National Corporation, Bancorp South Bank, First Tennessee Bank, National Association, granting 1701 Sealed Additional Attachments to Main Document, denying 1703 Sealed Document, granting as to Smith; otherwise denying 1692 Notice (Other) filed by RBS Citizens, National Association, granting 1699 Sealed Additional Attachments to Main Document, denying 1697 Sealed Patent Document, granting 1708 Sealed Document. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 12/22/09. (mrm, )
December 22, 2009 Filing 1794 Sealed Transcript. Sealed portions of 12-2-09 Motion Hearing. (aec, )
December 22, 2009 Filing 1793 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 1785 DATATREASURY'S Sealed Response IN OPPOSITION to Motion FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT - DAMAGES (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit S)(Roach, Nelson)
December 21, 2009 Filing 1792 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 1791 Sealed Response to Motion, 1787 Sealed Response to Motion,,, 1785 Sealed Response to Motion,,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit 25, # 26 Exhibit 26, # 27 Exhibit 27, # 28 Exhibit 28, # 29 Exhibit 29, # 30 Exhibit 30, # 31 Exhibit 31, # 32 Exhibit 32, # 33 Exhibit 33)(Roach, Nelson)
December 21, 2009 Filing 1791 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 1733 SEALED MOTION Moving Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Indefiniteness filed by Datatreasury Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 ROACH DECLARATION, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit N, # 16 Text of Proposed Order)(Roach, Nelson)
December 21, 2009 Filing 1790 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 1787 Sealed Response to Motion,,,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Q, # 2 Exhibit QQ, # 3 Exhibit R, # 4 Exhibit S, # 5 Exhibit SS, # 6 Exhibit T, # 7 Exhibit TT, # 8 Exhibit U, # 9 Exhibit UU, # 10 Exhibit V, # 11 Exhibit VV, # 12 Exhibit W, # 13 Exhibit WW, # 14 Exhibit X, # 15 Exhibit XX, # 16 Exhibit Y, # 17 Exhibit YY, # 18 Exhibit Z, # 19 Exhibit ZZ, # 20 Text of Proposed Order, # 21 Exhibit RR)(Roach, Nelson)
December 21, 2009 Filing 1789 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT.NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH COURT'S MOTION PRACTICE ORDER (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Baxter, Samuel)
December 21, 2009 Filing 1788 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT.NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH THE COURT'S MOTION PRACTICE ORDER (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Baxter, Samuel)
December 21, 2009 Filing 1787 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 1732 SEALED MOTION For Summary Judgement of Non-Infringement filed by Datatreasury Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 ROACH DECLARATION, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit AA, # 4 Exhibit AAA, # 5 Exhibit B, # 6 Exhibit BB, # 7 Exhibit BBB, # 8 Exhibit C, # 9 Exhibit CC, # 10 Exhibit CCC, # 11 Exhibit D, # 12 Exhibit DD, # 13 Exhibit DDD, # 14 Exhibit E, # 15 Exhibit EE, # 16 Exhibit F, # 17 Exhibit FF, # 18 Exhibit G, # 19 Exhibit GG, # 20 Exhibit H, # 21 Exhibit HH, # 22 Exhibit HHH, # 23 Exhibit I, # 24 Exhibit III, # 25 Exhibit J, # 26 Exhibit JJ, # 27 Exhibit JJJ, # 28 Exhibit K, # 29 Exhibit KK, # 30 Exhibit KKK, # 31 Exhibit L, # 32 Exhibit LL, # 33 Exhibit LLL, # 34 Exhibit M, # 35 Exhibit MM, # 36 Exhibit MMM, # 37 Exhibit N, # 38 Exhibit NN, # 39 Exhibit NNN, # 40 Exhibit O, # 41 Exhibit OO, # 42 Exhibit OOO, # 43 Exhibit P, # 44 Exhibit PP)(Roach, Nelson)
December 21, 2009 Filing 1786 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT.NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH COURT'S MOTION PRACTICE ORDER (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Baxter, Samuel)
December 21, 2009 Filing 1785 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 1731 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment of Viewpointe Archive Services LLC and The Clearing House Payments Company, LLC filed by Datatreasury Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 ROACH DECLARATION, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit N, # 16 Exhibit O, # 17 Exhibit P, # 18 Exhibit Q, # 19 Exhibit R, # 20 Text of Proposed Order)(Roach, Nelson)
December 21, 2009 Filing 1784 Wells Fargo's Sealed Notice of Compliance and Exhibit 1. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Rankin, Weldon)
December 21, 2009 Filing 1783 SEALED PATENT ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 1782 Notice (Other). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Frost, Claudia)
December 21, 2009 Filing 1782 NOTICE by RBS Citizens, National Association re 1692 Notice (Other) Notice of Compliance with Court's Motion Practice Order (Frost, Claudia)
December 21, 2009 Filing 1781 Sealed Document. The Clearing House Payments Company, LLC and Viewpointe Archive Services, LLC Notice of Compliance with Court's Motion Practice Order and Daubert Reply Letter (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(McGee, Preston)
December 21, 2009 Filing 1780 Sealed Document. Notice of Compliance with Court's Motion Practice Order by Defendants Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America, National Association, LaSalle Bank Corporation, LaSalle Bank, N.A., BB&T Corporation, Branch Banking & Trust Co., Wachovia Corporation, Wachovia Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo, N.A., The Clearing House Payments Company L.L.C. f/k/a Small Value Payments Co., L.L.C., First Horizon National Corporation, First Tennessee Bank, N.A., Bancorpsouth, Inc., Bancorpsouth Bank, RBS Citizens, N.A., U.S. Bancorp, U. S. Bank, National Association, Viewpointe Archive Services, LLC, Keycorp, Keybank National Association, Suntrust Banks, Inc., Suntrust Bank [re: Dkts 1706/1707 and Dkt. 1756](Attachments:#(1) Exhibit 1) (Melsheimer, Thomas)
December 21, 2009 Filing 1779 NOTICE by Bancorpsouth, Inc., Bancorp South Bank, First Horizon National Corporation, First Tennessee Bank, National Association re 1702 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) (Notice of Compliance with Courts Motion Practice Order) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Gray, Tonya)
December 21, 2009 Filing 1778 NOTICE by Viewpointe Archive Services, LLC of Compliance with Court's Motion Practice Order (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Sammi, Paramjeet)
December 21, 2009 Filing 1777 Sealed Document. Notice of Compliance with Court's Motion Practice Orders: BB&T Reply Letter Brief (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Williams, E Danielle)
December 21, 2009 Filing 1776 Sealed Document. Notice of Compliance with Court's Motion Practice Orders: Wachovia Reply Letter Brief (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Williams, E Danielle)
December 21, 2009 Filing 1775 NOTICE by Viewpointe Archive Services, LLC, U.S. Bancorp, BB&T Corporation, RBS Citizens, National Association, The Clearing House Payments Company, LLC re 1695 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) of Compliance with Court's Motion Practice Order (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex 1)(Keener, Jason)
December 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1774 ORDER; The Court hereby orders SEALED all portions of the hearing transcript during which the courtroom was cleared of all persons other than counsel for DataTreasury and outside counsel for Fish & Richardson P.C. For the hearing held on December 2, 2009. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 12/21/09. (mrm, )
December 21, 2009 Filing 1773 Sealed Notice of Compliance with Court's Motion Practice Order (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Peterson, Liane)
December 21, 2009 Filing 1772 NOTICE by FISH & RICHARDSON, P.C. re 1442 Emergency SEALED MOTION TO DISQUALIFY ATTORNEY PAUL DE STEFANO AND THE LAW FIRM OF FISH & RICHARDSON, P.C. AND EMERGENCY REQUEST FOR A TEMPORARY ORDER REQUESTING FISH & RICHARDSON, P.C.TO HAVE NO FURTHER CONTACT WITH ANY OTHER PARTIES OR ATTORNEYS IN (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Phelan, Calvin)
December 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1771 ORDER granting 1769 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery; ORDERED that Defendant may take the depositions of Hugh M. Smith and John E. Hiles after December 30, 2009.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 12/18/09. (mrm, )
December 18, 2009 Filing 1770 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL "REDACTED" TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on December 2, 2009 regarding Motion to Disquality Counsel before Judge David Folsom. Court Reporter/Transcriber Libby Crawford. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/21/2010. (sm, )
December 17, 2009 Filing 1769 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Motion for Leave to Take Depositions of Experts after December 30, 2009 by The Clearing House Payments Company, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McGee, Preston)
December 17, 2009 ***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTY - ATTY WILL REFILE Document # 1767, Unopoosed Motion for Extension of time to file discovery. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
December 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1768 ORDER granting 1766 Motion TO EXTEND EXPERT DISCOVERY DEADLINE. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 12/17/09. (mrm, )
December 17, 2009 Filing 1767 ***FILED IN ERROR. ATTY WILL REFILE. PLEASE IGNORE.***Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery For Leave to Take Depositions of Experts After December 30, 2009 by The Clearing House Payments Company, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McGee, Preston) Modified on 12/17/2009 (ch, ).
December 16, 2009 Filing 1766 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rankin, Weldon)
December 16, 2009 Filing 1765 DATATREASURY CORPORATION'S SEALED NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH THE COURT'S MOTION PRACTICE ORDER. (REPLACES DOCUMENT #1763) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Roach, Nelson)
December 16, 2009 ***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 1763, Notice of Compliance. Incorrect attachment; atty will refile PLEASE IGNORE.*** (rml, )
December 16, 2009 Filing 1764 DATATREASURY CORPORATION'S SEALED NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH COURT'S MOTION PRACTICE ORDER. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Roach, Nelson)
December 16, 2009 Filing 1763 ***PLEASE IGNORE - ATTY TO REFILE***** DATATREASURY CORPORATION'S SEALED NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH COURT'S MOTION PRACTICE ORDER. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Roach, Nelson) Modified on 12/16/2009 (rml, ).
December 14, 2009 Filing 1762 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 1761 Notice (Other). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Roach, Nelson)
December 14, 2009 Filing 1761 NOTICE by Datatreasury Corporation re 1710 Sealed Patent Document Notice of Compliance with Court's Motion Practice Order (Roach, Nelson)
December 14, 2009 Filing 1760 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 1759 Notice (Other). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Roach, Nelson)
December 14, 2009 Filing 1759 NOTICE by Datatreasury Corporation re 1709 Sealed Patent Document Notice of Compliance with Court's Motion Practice Order (Roach, Nelson)
December 14, 2009 Filing 1758 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 1708 Sealed Document. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Roach, Nelson)
December 14, 2009 Filing 1757 NOTICE by Datatreasury Corporation re 1708 Sealed Document Notice of Compliance with Court's Motion Practice Order (Roach, Nelson)
December 14, 2009 Filing 1756 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 1755 Notice (Other). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Roach, Nelson)
December 14, 2009 Filing 1755 NOTICE by Datatreasury Corporation re 1707 Sealed Additional Attachments to Main Document, 1706 Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other) Notice of Compliance with Court's Motion Practice Order (Roach, Nelson)
December 14, 2009 Filing 1754 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 1753 Notice (Other). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Roach, Nelson)
December 14, 2009 Filing 1753 NOTICE by Datatreasury Corporation re 1705 Notice (Other) Notice of Compliance with Court's Motion Practice Order (Roach, Nelson)
December 14, 2009 Filing 1752 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 1751 Notice (Other). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Roach, Nelson)
December 14, 2009 Filing 1751 NOTICE by Datatreasury Corporation re 1703 Sealed Document Notice of Compliance with Court's Motion Practice Order (Roach, Nelson)
December 14, 2009 Filing 1750 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 1749 Notice (Other). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Roach, Nelson)
December 14, 2009 Filing 1749 NOTICE by Datatreasury Corporation re 1702 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) Notice of Compliance with Court's Motion Practice Order (Roach, Nelson)
December 14, 2009 Filing 1748 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 1747 Notice (Other). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Roach, Nelson)
December 14, 2009 Filing 1747 NOTICE by Datatreasury Corporation re 1701 Sealed Additional Attachments to Main Document, 1700 Notice (Other) Notice of Compliance with Court's Motion Practice Order (Roach, Nelson)
December 14, 2009 Filing 1746 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 1745 Notice (Other). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Roach, Nelson)
December 14, 2009 Filing 1745 NOTICE by Datatreasury Corporation re 1698 Notice (Other), 1699 Sealed Additional Attachments to Main Document Notice of Compliance with Court's Motion Practice Order (Roach, Nelson)
December 14, 2009 Filing 1744 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 1743 Notice (Other). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Roach, Nelson)
December 14, 2009 Filing 1743 NOTICE by Datatreasury Corporation re 1697 Sealed Patent Document Notice of Compliance with Court's Motion Practice Order (Roach, Nelson)
December 14, 2009 Filing 1742 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 1741 Notice (Other). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Roach, Nelson)
December 14, 2009 Filing 1741 NOTICE by Datatreasury Corporation re 1696 Sealed Additional Attachments to Main Document, 1693 Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other) Notice of Compliance with Court's Motion Practice Order (Roach, Nelson)
December 14, 2009 Filing 1740 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 1739 Notice (Other). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Roach, Nelson)
December 14, 2009 Filing 1739 NOTICE by Datatreasury Corporation re 1695 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) Notice of Compliance with Court's Motion Practice Order (Roach, Nelson)
December 14, 2009 Filing 1738 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 1737 Notice (Other). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Roach, Nelson)
December 14, 2009 Filing 1737 NOTICE by Datatreasury Corporation re 1691 Notice (Other), 1692 Notice (Other) of Compliance with the Court's Practice Order (Roach, Nelson)
December 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1736 ORDER, granting 1734 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss COMERICA INCORPORATED and COMERICA BANK filed by Datatreasury Corporation., Comerica Incorporated and Comerica Bank terminated.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 12/14/09. (mrm, )
December 11, 2009 Filing 1735 NOTICE by Lasalle Bank Corporation, Lasalle Bank NA (Request for Termination of Electronic Notices) (DeRieux, Elizabeth)
December 11, 2009 Filing 1734 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss COMERICA INCORPORATED and COMERICA BANK by Datatreasury Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Roach, Nelson)
December 9, 2009 Filing 1733 SEALED MOTION Moving Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Indefiniteness by Viewpointe Archive Services, LLC, Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, U.S. Bancorp, Wachovia Corporation, Wachovia Bank, National Association, Suntrust Banks, Inc., Suntrust Bank, BB&T Corporation, Branch Banking and Trust Company, RBS Citizens, National Association, Bancorpsouth, Inc., Bancorp South Bank, First Horizon National Corporation, First Tennessee Bank, National Association, Keycorp, Keybank National Association, Small Value Payments Company, LLC, The Clearing House Payments Company, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Jeffrey Johnson, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Frost, Claudia)
December 9, 2009 Filing 1732 SEALED MOTION For Summary Judgement of Non-Infringement by Wachovia Corporation, Wachovia Bank, National Association, Suntrust Banks, Inc., Suntrust Bank, BB&T Corporation, Branch Banking and Trust Company, Keycorp, Keybank National Association. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Declaration of Geoffrey L. Smith, # 11 Exhibit A to Smith Dec., # 12 Exhibit B to Smith Dec., # 13 Exhibit C to Smith Dec., # 14 Exhibit D to Smith Dec., # 15 Exhibit E to Smith Dec., # 16 Exhibit F to Smith Dec., # 17 Exhibit G to Smith Dec., # 18 Exhibit H to Smith Dec., # 19 Exhibit I to Smith Dec., # 20 Exhibit J to Smith Dec., # 21 Exhibit K to Smith Dec., # 22 Exhibit L to Smith Dec.)(Williams, E Danielle)
December 9, 2009 Filing 1731 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment of Viewpointe Archive Services LLC and The Clearing House Payments Company, LLC by The Clearing House Payments Company, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Statement of Undisputed Facts, # 2 Exhibit Declaration of Preston W. McGee, # 3 Exhibit #1, # 4 Exhibit #2, # 5 Exhibit #3, # 6 Exhibit #4, # 7 Exhibit #5, # 8 Errata #6, # 9 Exhibit #7, # 10 Exhibit #8, # 11 Exhibit #9, # 12 Exhibit #10, # 13 Exhibit #11, # 14 Exhibit #12, # 15 Exhibit #13, # 16 Text of Proposed Order)(McGee, Preston)
December 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1730 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/1/2010 in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge David Folsom. initial Pretrial Conference set for 1/13/2010 in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before Judge David Folsom. Jury instructions due by 2/15/2010 Jury Selection set for 3/2/2010 10:00 AM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before Judge David Folsom. Mediation Completion due by 12/25/2009. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 2/15/2010.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 12/9/09. (mrm, )
December 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1729 ORDER granting as modified 1694 Motion to Amend the Docket Control Order. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 12/9/09. (mrm, )
December 8, 2009 Filing 1728 RESPONSE in Opposition re 1694 Opposed MOTION for extension of time to seek leave of Court to File Daubert/FRE 702 motions and motions to strike or limit expert testimony filed by Viewpointe Archive Services, LLC, Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America, National Association, U.S. Bancorp, U.S. Bank, National Association, Wachovia Corporation, Wachovia Bank, National Association, Suntrust Banks, Inc., Suntrust Bank, BB&T Corporation, Branch Banking and Trust Company, Comerica Bank, RBS Citizens, National Association, Bancorpsouth, Inc., Bancorp South Bank, First Horizon National Corporation, First Tennessee Bank, National Association, Comerica Incorporated, Keycorp, Keybank National Association, Lasalle Bank Corporation, Lasalle Bank NA, Small Value Payments Company, LLC, The Clearing House Payments Company, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Melsheimer, Thomas)
December 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1727 ORDER, The Court previously ordered that leave of Court must be obtained before any motion for summary judgment may be filed. See 9/16/2009 Order, Dkt. No. 1400 . The following table lists the letter briefs seeking such leave (identified by general topics and docket numbers) and the Courts ruling on whether leave is granted or denied. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 12/7/09. (mrm, )
December 7, 2009 Filing 1726 Plaintiff/Counter-Defendant DataTreasury Corporation's ANSWER to Complaint 1601 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaims of Viewpointe Archive Services, LLC by Datatreasury Corporation.(Bruster, Anthony)
December 7, 2009 Filing 1725 Plaintiff/Counter-Defendant DataTreasury Corporation's ANSWER to Complaint 1598 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaims of Bank of America, N.A. by Datatreasury Corporation.(Bruster, Anthony)
December 7, 2009 Filing 1724 Plaintiff/Counter-Defendant DataTreasury Corporations ANSWER to Complaint 1596 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaims of Bank of America Corporation by Datatreasury Corporation.(Bruster, Anthony)
December 7, 2009 Filing 1723 Plaintiff/Counter-Defendant DataTreasury Corporation's ANSWER to 1600 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of First Tennessee Bank National Association and First Horizon National Corporation by Datatreasury Corporation.(Bruster, Anthony)
December 7, 2009 Filing 1722 Plaintiff/Counter-Defendant DataTreasury Corporation's ANSWER to Complaint , Counterclaims of RBS Citizens, National Association (Amended Answer Dkt. No. 1597) to DataTreasury's Fourth Amended Complaint by Datatreasury Corporation.(Bruster, Anthony)
December 7, 2009 Filing 1721 Plaintiff/Counter-Defendant DataTreasury Corporation's ANSWER to Complaint , Counterclaims of Wells Fargo & Company and Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Amended Answer Dkt. No. 1594) to DataTreasury's Fourth Amended Complaint by Datatreasury Corporation.(Bruster, Anthony)
December 7, 2009 Filing 1720 Plaintiff/Counter-Defendant DataTreasury Corporation's ANSWER to Complaint ,Counterclaims of U.S. Bancorp and U.S. Bank National Association (Amended Answer Dkt. No. 1593) to DataTreasury's Fourth Amended Complaint by Datatreasury Corporation.(Bruster, Anthony)
December 7, 2009 Filing 1719 Plaintiff/Counter-Defendant DataTreasury Corporation's ANSWER to Complaint , Counterclaims of The Clearing House Payments Company LLC (Amended Answer Dkt. No. 1592) to DataTreasury's Fourth Amended Complaint by Datatreasury Corporation.(Bruster, Anthony)
December 7, 2009 Filing 1718 Plaintiff/Counter-Defendant DataTreasury Corporation's ANSWER to Complaint ,Counterclaims of KeyBank National Association and KeyCorp (Amended Answer Dkt. No. 1590) to DataTreasury's Fourth Amended Complaint by Datatreasury Corporation.(Bruster, Anthony)
December 7, 2009 Filing 1717 Plaintiff/Counter-Defendant DataTreasury Corporation's ANSWER to Complaint , Counterclaims of SunTrust Banks, Inc. and SunTrust Bank (Amended Answer Dkt. No. 1589) to DataTreasury's Fourth Amended Complaint by Datatreasury Corporation.(Bruster, Anthony)
December 7, 2009 Filing 1716 Plaintiff/Counter-Defendant DataTreasury Corporation's ANSWER to Complaint , Counterclaims of Wachovia Corporation and Wachovia Bank, National Association (Amended Answer Dkt. No. 1588) to DataTreasury's Fourth Amended Complaint by Datatreasury Corporation.(Bruster, Anthony)
December 7, 2009 Filing 1715 Plaintiff/Counter-Defendant DataTreasury Corporation's ANSWER to Complaint ,Counterclaims of Comerica Incorporated and Comerica Bank (Amended Answer Dkt. No. 1586) to DataTreasury's Fourth Amended Complaint by Datatreasury Corporation.(Bruster, Anthony)
December 7, 2009 Filing 1714 Plaintiff/Counter-Defendant DataTreasury Corporation's ANSWER to 1585 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of BB&T Corporation and Branch Banking and Trust Company by Datatreasury Corporation.(Bruster, Anthony)
December 7, 2009 Filing 1713 Plaintiff/Counter-Defendant DataTreasury Corporation's ANSWER to 1599 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Bancorpsouth, Inc. and Bancorpsouth Bank by Datatreasury Corporation.(Bruster, Anthony)
December 7, 2009 Filing 1712 Plaintiff/Counter-Defendant DataTreasury Corporation's ANSWER to 1584 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim,, of BANA Holding Corporation f/k/a LaSalle Bank Corporation by Datatreasury Corporation.(Bruster, Anthony)
December 7, 2009 Filing 1711 Plaintiff / Counter-Defendant DataTreasury Corporation's ANSWER to 1583 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim,, of LaSalle Bank, N.A. by Datatreasury Corporation.(Bruster, Anthony)
December 4, 2009 Filing 1710 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT by Dfts Suntrust Bank. NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH COURT'S MOTION PRACTICE ORDER (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Baxter, Samuel) Modified on 12/7/2009 (sm, ).
December 4, 2009 Filing 1709 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT.Notice of Compliance with Court's Motion Practice Order by Dfts Keycorp(Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Baxter, Samuel) Modified on 12/7/2009 (sm, ).
December 4, 2009 Filing 1708 Wells Fargo's SEALED Notice of Compliance with Court's Motion Practice Order and Sealed Attachment. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Rankin, Weldon) Modified on 12/7/2009 (sm, ).
December 4, 2009