Taylor et al v. Acxiom Corporation et al Featured Case

Plaintiffs bring a class action against defendants for unlawfully purchasing Texas' entire database of names, addresses and other personal information from the Texas Department of Public Safety.

Plaintiff: Sharon Taylor, James Douglas Booker, Lowry Briley, Twilah Brown, James D Clary, Sharon A Clary, Alice M Cooks, Arlando Cooks, Elizabeth DeWitt, Kenneth Gossip, Sr, Kennice Gossip, Pamela Hensley, Robert G Holliness, Carolyn Latham Holub, Brandi Jewell, Tracy Karp, David Patterson, Ronnie Phillips, James Roberts, Luz Ann Roberts, Kimberly Dawn Underwood, Marilyn Whitaker, William "Troy&q Wilson, Willie B. Booker and Venisia Booker McGuire
Defendant: Acxiom Corporation, Choicepoint Public Records Database Tech Inc, Choicepoint Public Records Inc, Choicepoint, Inc, ChoicePoint Services, Inc, Seisint, Inc, Lexisnexis, Reed Elsevier, Inc and Chex Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2007cv00001
Filed: January 2, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Marshall Office
County: San Augustine
Presiding Judge: T. John Ward
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2010 Filing 122 USCA JUDGMENT - Affirming the decision of the District Court (ehs, )
July 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER of USCA as to 107 Notice of Appeal filed by All Plaintiffs. Appellee JI Specialty Service Inc, only, is dismissed from the appeals as of 7/9/10, pursuant to the stipulation of the parties (ehs, )
November 11, 2009 Filing 120 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Chex Systems, Inc., Sharon Taylor, Choicepoint Public Records Inc, Choicepoint, Inc, ChoicePoint Services, Inc, Seisint, Inc, Lexisnexis, Reed Elsevier, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Butts, George)
January 9, 2009 Filing 119 Notification that ROA has been forwarded to Chad Pinson, Dallas, Texas (ehs, )
December 2, 2008 Supplemental ROA sent to Counsel Jeremy Wilson - one volume as to all cases (ehs, )
November 24, 2008 Filing 118 USCA Case Number 08-41083 for 116 Subsequent Notice of Appeal filed by All Plaintiffs. (ehs, )
November 17, 2008 Filing 117 USCA Case Number 08-41083 for 113 Subsequent Notice of Appeal filed by All Plaintiffs. (ehs, )
November 14, 2008 Filing 116 Subsequent NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 105 Judgment, 108 Judgment,, 114 Judgment by All Plaintiffs Second Amended Notice of Appeal. Appeal Record due by 10/23/2008. (Wilson, Jeremy)
November 12, 2008 Appeal Remark re 113 Subsequent Notice of Appeal, 107 Notice of Appeal : ROA sent to counsel Jeremy R Wilson. Two boxes containing 3 volumes of 2:07cv1, 2 volumes of 2:07cv13, 2 volumes of 2:07cv14, 5 volumes of 2:07cv17, 4 volumes of 2:07cv18 and 2 volumes of 2:07cv410 (ehs, )
November 10, 2008 Filing 115 Appeal Remark re 107 Notice of Appeal, 113 Subsequent Notice of Appeal : ROA requested from counsel Jeremy R Wilson(ehs, )
November 4, 2008 Filing 114 AMENDED FINAL JUDGMENT - The Judgment rendered on 9/9/08, remains in effect to the extent that all claims against defts in Civil Action 07-13, 07-14, 07-17, 07-18 and 07-410. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 10/16/08. (ehs, )
October 30, 2008 Filing 113 Subsequent NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 105 Judgment, 108 Judgment,, by All Plaintiffs. Appeal Record due by 10/23/2008. (Wilson, Jeremy)
October 30, 2008 Filing 112 USCA Case Number 08-41083 for 107 Notice of Appeal filed by All Plaintiffs. (ehs, )
October 21, 2008 Filing 111 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by All Plaintiffs - No transcript necessary, no hearings held (ehs, )
October 16, 2008 Filing 110 NOTICE by Acxiom Corporation re 109 Second MOTION to Alter Judgment (Notice of Consent to the Relief Requested in Plaintiffs' Second Motion to Amend Judgment With Respect to Acxiom Corporation) (Kelley, James)
October 15, 2008 Filing 109 Second MOTION to Alter Judgment by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wilson, Jeremy)
October 10, 2008 Filing 108 JUDGMENT - before the court is Plaintiffs Motion to Amend Judgment 106 . In complaince with the stay granted in this case and the injunction ordered by Judge Martinez in the Fresco Litigation, Plaintiffs Motion is hereby GRANTED. The judgment rendered on 9/9/08 remains in effect to the extent that all claims against Dft in Civil Action No. 07-13, 07-14, 07-17, 07-18, and 07-410 are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. This court will defer its judgment in Civil Action 07-01 until the injunction against Plaintiff has been removed. Signed by Judge Donald E. Walter on 10/1/08. (ch, )
October 9, 2008 Appeal Remark re 107 Notice of Appeal : Transcript order form mailed to cnsl for pltf Jeremy Wilson (ehs, )
October 8, 2008 Filing 107 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 105 Judgment by All Plaintiffs. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 05400000000001722182. Appeal Record due by 10/23/2008. (Wilson, Jeremy)
September 19, 2008 Filing 106 MOTION to Amend/Correct 105 Judgment, MOTION to Alter Judgment by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wilson, Jeremy)
September 9, 2008 Filing 105 JUDGMENT granting defts motion to dismiss with prejudice and sua sponte dismiss with prejudice pltf's claims against all remaining defts in 07-1, 07-13, 07-14, 07-17, 07-18 and 07-410. Signed by Judge Donald E. Walter on 9/8/08. (ehs, )
July 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER dismissing pltf's claims against deft MVR's for failure to prosecute.As of Order # 186 in case 2:07cv18 for pltf to show cause, pltf has failed to show cause. Deft MVR dismissed. Signed by Judge Donald E. Walter on 7/21/08. (ehs, )
June 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER granting 102 Stipulation of Dismissal as to deft Academy, Ltd. each party to bear its own costs, expenses and attorneys' fees. Signed by Judge Donald E. Walter on 6/17/08. (ehs, )
June 16, 2008 Filing 102 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Academy, Ltd. by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wilson, Jeremy)
June 13, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER granting 94 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by All Plaintiffs as to deft Texas Motor Transportation Association. Signed by Judge Donald E. Walter on 6/13/08. (ehs, )
May 28, 2008 Filing 100 NOTICE by Reliant Energy, Inc. Firm Name Change (Chenoweth, Eric)
May 27, 2008 Filing 99 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 72 MOTION to Dismiss on Common Issues and Response to Plaintiffs' Statement of Violations filed by All Plaintiffs. (Wilson, Jeremy)
May 27, 2008 Filing 98 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 69 Supplemental MOTION to Dismiss (Dkt. 54 in 2:07-cv-14) and to Consolidated Motion to Dismiss and Response to Plaintiffs' Statement of Violations of the DPPA filed by All Plaintiffs. (Wilson, Jeremy)
May 19, 2008 Filing 97 REPLY to Response to Motion to Dismiss on Common Iusses and Response to Plaintiff's Statement of Violations of hte Driver Policy Protection Act filed by Continueded.com, LLC. (Grau, James)
May 19, 2008 Filing 96 REPLY to Response to Motion re 72 MOTION to Dismiss on Common Issues and Response to Plaintiffs' Statement of Violations Defendant ASL's Supplement to Defendants' Consolidated Reply filed by American Student List Co., Inc.. (Maris, Stephen)
May 16, 2008 Filing 95 REPLY to Response to Motion re 69 Supplemental MOTION to Dismiss (Dkt. 54 in 2:07-cv-14) and to Consolidated Motion to Dismiss and Response to Plaintiffs' Statement of Violations of the DPPA filed by Globe Life and Accident Insurance Company. (Castaneda, Kirsten)
May 16, 2008 Filing 94 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant Texas Motor Transportation Association by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wilson, Jeremy)
May 15, 2008 Filing 93 NOTICE by InfoNations, Inc. re 62 Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other) Reply to Response to Supplement to Consolidated Motion to Dismiss on Common Issues (Moos, Marvin)
May 15, 2008 Filing 92 NOTICE by Zebec Data Systems, Inc. re 62 Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other) Reply to Plaintiffs' Response to Supplement to Consolidated Motion to Dismiss on Common Issues (Moos, Marvin)
May 15, 2008 Filing 91 REPLY to Response to Motion re 72 MOTION to Dismiss on Common Issues and Response to Plaintiffs' Statement of Violations filed by ACS State & Local Solutions, Inc., Gila Corporation, American Electric Power Service Corporation, Southwestern Bell Telephone, LP, Texas Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company, Insurance Technologies Corporation, JI Specialty Services, Inc., Globe Life and Accident Insurance Company, Hawkeye Insurance Services, Inc.,, ISO Claims Services, Inc., United Teacher Associates Insurance Company, Spartan Insurance Company, Safeway, Inc.,, HEB Grocery Company, LP, The Hearst Corporation, Safety-USA Institute, LLC, U.S. Interactive, Inc., The Talbot Group, Inc., Background Information Systems, Inc., Academy, LTD, CarFax, Inc, ABC Data, American Student List Co., Inc., Aristotle International, Inc.,, Continueded.com, LLC, Driver Training Associates, Inc., Federated Retail Holdings, Inc., Household Drivers Report, Inc., Paradise Development, Inc., RealPage, Inc., Biometric Access Company, Emaginenet Technologies, Inc., LML Payment Systems Corp, Telecheck Services, Inc., Acxiom Corporation, Zebec Data Systems, Inc., Allied Resident/Employee Screening Service, Inc., ADP Screening and Selection Services, Inc., American Driving Records, Inc., FEDCHEX. LLC., Jon Latorella, Marshall Systems Technology, Inc., Source Data, Inc., URAPI, PropertyInfo Corporation, Tenant Tracker, Inc., Defensivedriving.com, Cross-Sell, Inc., InfoNations, Inc., Realty Computer Solutions, Inc., Urapi, Inc., National Statistical Service Corporation, Reliant Energy, Inc., Dallas Computer Associates, AMERICAN MUNICIPAL SERVICES CORPORATION, Acxiom Risk Mitigation, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Motion for Intervention# 2 Exhibit Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curie Brief)(John, Philip)
May 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER granting 89 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Donald E. Walter on 5/15/08. (ehs, )
May 14, 2008 Filing 89 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages For Reply Brief by ACS State & Local Solutions, Inc., Gila Corporation, American Electric Power Service Corporation, Southwestern Bell Telephone, LP, Texas Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company, Insurance Technologies Corporation, JI Specialty Services, Inc., Globe Life and Accident Insurance Company, Hawkeye Insurance Services, Inc.,, ISO Claims Services, Inc., United Teacher Associates Insurance Company, Spartan Insurance Company, Safeway, Inc.,, HEB Grocery Company, LP, The Hearst Corporation, Safety-USA Institute, LLC, U.S. Interactive, Inc., The Talbot Group, Inc., Background Information Systems, Inc., Academy, LTD, CarFax, Inc, ABC Data, American Student List Co., Inc., Aristotle International, Inc.,, Continueded.com, LLC, Driver Training Associates, Inc., Federated Retail Holdings, Inc., Household Drivers Report, Inc., Paradise Development, Inc., RealPage, Inc., Biometric Access Company, Emaginenet Technologies, Inc., LML Payment Systems Corp, Telecheck Services, Inc., Acxiom Corporation, Zebec Data Systems, Inc., Allied Resident/Employee Screening Service, Inc., ADP Screening and Selection Services, Inc., American Driving Records, Inc., FEDCHEX. LLC., Jon Latorella, Marshall Systems Technology, Inc., Source Data, Inc., URAPI, PropertyInfo Corporation, Tenant Tracker, Inc., Defensivedriving.com, Cross-Sell, Inc., InfoNations, Inc., Realty Computer Solutions, Inc., National Statistical Service Corporation, Reliant Energy, Inc., Dallas Computer Associates, AMERICAN MUNICIPAL SERVICES CORPORATION, Acxiom Risk Mitigation, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Agreed Motion for Leave)(John, Philip)
May 13, 2008 NOTICE FROM CLERK re 80 Response to Motion. Entry has been modified to show the link to document being responded too which is (#67) (sm, )
May 13, 2008 ***FILED IN ERROR (DUPLICATE FILING, #80 is same pleading). Document # 85, Response. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (sm, )
May 9, 2008 Filing 88 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs re 75 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) Plaintiffs' Response to Supplemental Response of Defendant U.S. Interactive, Inc. to Plaintiffs' Statement of Violations of the Drivers' Privacy Protection Act (Wilson, Jeremy)
May 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER granting pltf's Notice of Dismissal as to deft Softech International Inc without prejudice. Each party to bear its own costs, expenses and attorneys' fees. Signed by Judge Donald E. Walter on 5/9/08. (ehs, )
May 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER granting pltf's notice of dismissal as to deft Industrial Foundation of America filed in 2:07cv13. Deft dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Donald E. Walter on 5/9/08. (ehs, )
May 9, 2008 Filing 85 ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE.***RESPONSE to Supplemental Motion to Dismiss, doc 67, by All Plaintiffs. (Wilson, Jeremy) Modified on 5/13/2008 (sm, ).
May 9, 2008 Filing 84 RESPONSE to 74 Response to Motion, by All Plaintiffs. (Wilson, Jeremy)
May 9, 2008 Filing 83 RESPONSE to Motion re 72 MOTION to Dismiss on Common Issues and Response to Plaintiffs' Statement of Violations filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit # 2 Exhibit # 3 Exhibit)(Wilson, Jeremy)
May 9, 2008 Filing 82 RESPONSE to 70 Response to Non-Motion, by All Plaintiffs. (Wilson, Jeremy)
May 9, 2008 Filing 81 RESPONSE to 66 Response to Non-Motion Defendant Telecheck's Response to Plaintiffs' Statement of Violations of the DPPA by All Plaintiffs. (Wilson, Jeremy)
May 9, 2008 Filing 80 RESPONSE to 67 Supplemental Motion to Dismiss on Common Issues and Response to Plaintiffs' Statement of Violations of the DPPA filed by All Plaintiffs. (Wilson, Jeremy) Modified on 5/13/2008 (sm, ).
May 9, 2008 Filing 79 RESPONSE to 71 Response to Non-Motion, Infonation Inc.'s Response to Plaintiffs' Statement of Violations of the DPPA and Supplement to Consoldated Motion ot Dismiss on Common Issues by All Plaintiffs. (Wilson, Jeremy)
May 9, 2008 Filing 78 RESPONSE to Motion re 69 Supplemental MOTION to Dismiss (Dkt. 54 in 2:07-cv-14) and to Consolidated Motion to Dismiss and Response to Plaintiffs' Statement of Violations of the DPPA filed by All Plaintiffs. (Wilson, Jeremy)
April 30, 2008 Filing 77 NOTICE of Change of Address by Gayla Campbell Crain (Crain, Gayla)
April 30, 2008 NOTICE of Deficiency #76 regarding the NOTICE of Change of Address by Gayla Campbell Crain submitted Pleading not signed by attorney, Attorney to sign and refile. Correction should be made by one business day. (mpv, )
April 30, 2008 Filing 76 ***FILED IN ERROR; PLEASE IGNORE***NOTICE of Change of Address by Gayla Campbell Crain (Crain, Gayla) Modified on 4/30/2008 (mpv, ).
April 21, 2008 Filing 75 NOTICE by U.S. Interactive, Inc. re 62 Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other) Supplemental Response of Defendant US Interactive to Plaintiffs' Statement of Violations of the Driver's Privacy Protection Act (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Smith, Michael)
April 21, 2008 Filing 74 RESPONSE to Motion re 72 MOTION to Dismiss on Common Issues and Response to Plaintiffs' Statement of Violations Supplement to Defendants' Consolidated Motion to Dismiss on Common Issues and Response to Plaintiffs' Statement of Violations filed by American Student List Co., Inc.. (Maris, Stephen)
April 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER granting 64 Motion to Withdraw John P Perkins, III as cnsl for deft Biometric Acess Co. Signed by Judge Donald E. Walter on 4/21/08. (ehs, )
April 18, 2008 Filing 72 MOTION to Dismiss on Common Issues and Response to Plaintiffs' Statement of Violations by ACS State & Local Solutions, Inc., Global 360 BGS, Inc.,, Gila Corporation, American Electric Power Service Corporation, Industrial Foundation of America, Southwestern Bell Telephone, LP, Texas Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company, Insurance Technologies Corporation, JI Specialty Services, Inc., Softech International Inc., Globe Life and Accident Insurance Company, Hawkeye Insurance Services, Inc.,, ISO Claims Services, Inc., United Teacher Associates Insurance Company, Spartan Insurance Company, Safeway, Inc.,, HEB Grocery Company, LP, The Hearst Corporation, Safety-USA Institute, LLC, U.S. Interactive, Inc., The Talbot Group, Inc., Background Information Systems, Inc., Academy, LTD, CarFax, Inc, ABC Data, American Student List Co., Inc., Aristotle International, Inc.,, Continueded.com, LLC, Driver Training Associates, Inc., Federated Retail Holdings, Inc., Household Drivers Report, Inc., Lee Farish Computer Services, Inc., Paradise Development, Inc., RealPage, Inc., D. B. Stringfellow, Jr, Biometric Access Company, Emaginenet Technologies, Inc., LML Payment Systems Corp, Telecheck Services, Inc., Acxiom Corporation, Zebec Data Systems, Inc., Allied Resident/Employee Screening Service, Inc., ADP Screening and Selection Services, Inc., American Driving Records, Inc., FEDCHEX. LLC., Jon Latorella, Marshall Systems Technology, Inc., Source Data, Inc., URAPI, PropertyInfo Corporation, Tenant Tracker, Inc., Defensivedriving.com, Cross-Sell, Inc., InfoNations, Inc., Realty Computer Solutions, Inc., Urapi, Inc., National Statistical Service Corporation, Reliant Energy, Inc., Texas Motor Transportation Association, AMERICAN MUNICIPAL SERVICES CORPORATION, Acxiom Risk Mitigation, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Affidavit of Thomas Corea# 2 Text of Proposed Order Order)(John, Philip)
April 18, 2008 Filing 71 RESPONSE to 62 Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other) Plaintiffs' Statement of Violations of the Drivers' Privacy Protection Act and Supplement to Consolidated Motion to Dismiss on Common Issues by InfoNations, Inc.. (Moos, Marvin)
April 18, 2008 Filing 70 RESPONSE to 62 Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other) Plaintiffs' Statement of Violations of the Drivers' Privacy Protection Act and Supplement to Consolidated Motion to Dismiss on Common Issues by Zebec Data Systems, Inc.. (Moos, Marvin)
April 18, 2008 Filing 69 Supplemental MOTION to Dismiss (Dkt. 54 in 2:07-cv-14) and to Consolidated Motion to Dismiss and Response to Plaintiffs' Statement of Violations of the DPPA by Globe Life and Accident Insurance Company. (Castaneda, Kirsten)
April 18, 2008 Filing 68 Supplemental MOTION to Dismiss by Texas Motor Transportation Association. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Dodson, Richard)
April 18, 2008 Filing 67 Supplemental MOTION to Dismiss (pertaining to consolidated Motion to Dismiss on Common Issues and Response to Plaintiffs' Statement of Violations of the Driver Privacy Protection Act by Continueded.com, LLC. (Attachments: # 1)(Koen, Karl)
April 18, 2008 Filing 66 RESPONSE to 62 Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other) Plaintiffs' Statement of Violations of the Drivers' Privacy Protection Act by Telecheck Services, Inc.. (Zysek, Jodi)
April 17, 2008 Filing 65 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joshua Reed Thane on behalf of Biometric Access Company (Thane, Joshua)
April 17, 2008 Filing 64 MOTION to Withdraw Agreed Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record by Biometric Access Company. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer)
April 4, 2008 Filing 63 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs of Oral Argument Setting in Taylor, et. al. v. Linda Brooks v. Automotive Directions, Inc., et. al. (Wilson, Jeremy)
April 3, 2008 Filing 62 NOTICE by James D Clary, Sharon A Clary, Alice M Cooks, Arlando Cooks, Elizabeth DeWitt, Kenneth Gossip, Sr, Kennice Gossip, Pamela Hensley, Robert G Holliness, Carolyn Latham Holub, Sharon Taylor, Brandi Jewell, Tracy Karp, David Patterson, Ronnie Phillips, James Roberts, Luz Ann Roberts, Kimberly Dawn Underwood, Marilyn Whitaker, William "Troy&q Wilson, James Douglas Booker, Lowry Briley, Twilah Brown, William Troy Wilson, Venisia Booker McGuire, Willie B. Booker of Filing Statement Delineating DPPA Violations for Various Defendants (Wilson, Jeremy)
March 31, 2008 Filing 61 NOTICE by TXU Business of Service of Discovery Response (Oleson, Aimee)
March 31, 2008 NOTICE re 57 Notice (Other)Pleading returned to docket per Judge. (mpv, )
March 28, 2008 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding #57 the NOTICE by Driver Training Associates, Inc. of Service of Discovery Response submitted Wrong case number on document, attorney to refile correctly.. Correction should be made by one business day. (mpv, )
March 28, 2008 Filing 60 NOTICE by Acxiom Risk Mitigation, Inc., Acxiom Corporation (Notice of Service of Discovery Responses) (Kelley, James)
March 28, 2008 Filing 59 NOTICE by Globe Life and Accident Insurance Company re 46 Order,, Serving of Discovery Response (Castaneda, Kirsten)
March 28, 2008 Filing 58 NOTICE by ISO Claims Services, Inc. of Service of Discovery Response (Kaiser, Ryan)
March 28, 2008 Filing 57 NOTICE by Driver Training Associates, Inc. of Service of Discovery Response (Burton, J.)
March 28, 2008 Filing 56 NOTICE by Texas Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company of Service of Discovery Response (Higgins, Roger)
March 28, 2008 Filing 55 NOTICE by Softech International Inc. of Service of Discovery Response (Henry, Larry)
March 28, 2008 Filing 54 NOTICE by Tenant Tracker, Inc. of Discovery Response (Abernathy, Richard)
March 28, 2008 Filing 53 NOTICE by Aristotle International, Inc., Serivce of Interrogatory Response (Harrison, Guy)
March 28, 2008 Filing 52 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Guy N Harrison on behalf of Aristotle International, Inc., (Harrison, Guy)
March 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting deft InfoNation's motion for extension of time to file reply to pltf's response to deft's motion to dismiss #59 in case 2:07cv410. Deadline extended to file reply extended to 4/8/08. Signed by Judge Donald E. Walter on 3/26/08. (ehs, )
March 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER - granting 52 in case 2:07-cv-410 to File Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Donald E. Walter on 3/17/08. (ch, )
March 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER denying 48 Motion for Discovery. Signed by Judge Donald E. Walter on 3/17/08. (ch, )
March 13, 2008 Filing 48 MOTION for Discovery by James D Clary, Sharon A Clary, Alice M Cooks, Arlando Cooks, Elizabeth DeWitt, Kenneth Gossip, Sr, Kennice Gossip, Pamela Hensley, Robert G Holliness, Carolyn Latham Holub, Sharon Taylor, Brandi Jewell, Tracy Karp, David Patterson, Ronnie Phillips, James Roberts, Luz Ann Roberts, Kimberly Dawn Underwood, Marilyn Whitaker, William "Troy&q Wilson, James Douglas Booker, Lowry Briley, Twilah Brown, William Troy Wilson, Willie B. Booker, Venisia Booker McGuire. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wilson, Jeremy)
March 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER/Minute Entry consolidating cause number 2:07cv410 in 2:07cv1. Signed by Judge Donald E. Walter on 3/6/08. (ehs, )
March 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER consolidating case numbers 2:07cv13, 2:07cv14, 2:07cv17, 2:07cv18 are consolidated into Lead case 2:07cv1. Stay lifted in 2:07cv1 as to deft Acxion Corp., pltf to file a statement with the Court as to each individual pltf stating their claims. Deft have 15 days to response with pltf having 15 days to reply to response. Pending motions for more definite statement are moot and pending motions to dismiss may be re-urged in response to pltfs statement. Pltf's permitted limited discovery as set forth herein. Pltf's have 14 days to file an opposition to motion to dismiss # 114 , 2:07cv17 filed on behalf of Staff Force Inc.. Signed by Judge Donald E. Walter on 3/4/08. (ehs, )
February 29, 2008 Filing 45 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Ronald I Raether, Jr for Seisint, Inc, Reed Elsevier, Inc. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 2-1-3551 (ch, )
February 11, 2008 Filing 44 Minute Entry - Court setting Status Conference for proceedings before Judge Donald E. Walter.Status Conference set for 3/3/2008 01:30 PM in Ctrm 103 (Marshall) before Judge Donald E. Walter. (ehs, )
February 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER OF RECUSAL - Judge Davis recused. The Court has determined that all the judges of this court are putative members of the class in these six cases, and recusal is therefore mandated by 28 U.S.C. § 455(b)(4). These cases are hereby TRANSFERRED to the Hon. Donald D. Walter, Senior Judge for the United States District Court for the Western District of Louisiana, as Judge Walter has been authorized by the Fifth Circuit to preside over cases emanating from the United States district courts in Texas. Signed by Judge Thad Heartfield on 2/6/08. (ehs, )
February 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge David Folsom recused. Case reassigned to Judge Leonard Davis for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 2/1/08. (mrm, )
January 31, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge David Folsom for all further proceedings. Judge T. John Ward no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 1/31/08. (ehs, )
January 23, 2008 Filing 40 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gregory Blake Thompson on behalf of all plaintiffs (Thompson, Gregory)
November 15, 2007 Filing 39 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Chex Systems, Inc. identifying eFunds Corporation as Corporate Parent. (Greenspan, Alan)
September 25, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER denying without prejudice 7 Motion to Dismiss, denying without prejudice 15 Motion for Default Judgment, denying without prejudice 19 Motion to Dismiss, denying without prejudice 26 Motion to Dismiss, denying without prejudice 28 Motion to Stay . Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 9/25/07. (ch, )
May 18, 2007 Filing 37 REPLY to Response to Motion re 28 MOTION to Stay re 26 MOTION to Dismiss or in the alternative to Stay, 19 Amended MOTION to Dismiss, 26 MOTION to Dismiss or in the alternative to Stay filed by James D Clary, Sharon A Clary, Alice M Cooks, Arlando Cooks, Elizabeth DeWitt, Kenneth Gossip, Sr, Kennice Gossip, Pamela Hensley, Robert G Holliness, Carolyn Latham Holub, Sharon Taylor, Brandi Jewell, Tracy Karp, David Patterson, Ronnie Phillips, James Roberts, Luz Ann Roberts, Kimberly Dawn Underwood, Marilyn Whitaker, William "Troy&q Wilson, James Douglas Booker, Lowry Briley, Twilah Brown, Willie B. Booker, Venisia Booker McGuire. (Wilson, Jeremy)
May 16, 2007 Filing 36 NOTICE by Chex Systems, Inc. re 35 Response in Support of Motion,, 19 Amended MOTION to Dismiss Joinder of in Supplemental Brief in Support of Amended Joint Motion of Defendants Reed Elsevier, Inc., Seisint, Inc. and Choicepoint Entities to Dismiss First Amended Complaint or, Alternatively, to Stay Plaintiffs' Action (Greenspan, Alan)
May 16, 2007 Filing 35 REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO RESPONSE re 19 Amended MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint, or Alternatively, to Stay Plaintiffs' Action filed by Choicepoint Public Records Inc, Choicepoint, Inc, ChoicePoint Services, Inc, Seisint, Inc, Lexisnexis, Reed Elsevier, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C)(Beck, David) Modified on 5/16/2007 (mpv, ).
April 20, 2007 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the Motion to Withdraw Attorney #34 submitted No Certificate of Conference, no proposed order, clerk has repeatedly tried to get this correction. Correction should be made by one business day. (mpv, )
April 20, 2007 Filing 34 ***FILED IN ERROR; DEFICIENT DOCUMENT; PLEASE IGNORE*** MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Sharon Taylor. (Malley, Joseph) Modified on 5/3/2007 (mpv, ).
April 18, 2007 Filing 33 REPLY to Response to Motion re 26 MOTION to Dismiss or in the alternative to Stay filed by Chex Systems, Inc.. (Greenspan, Alan)
April 12, 2007 Filing 32 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney James M Walls for Chex Systems, Inc. (FEE PAID). (ch, )
April 9, 2007 Filing 31 RESPONSE in Opposition re 28 MOTION to Stay re 26 MOTION to Dismiss or in the alternative to Stay, 26 MOTION to Dismiss or in the alternative to Stay filed by James D Clary, Sharon A Clary, Alice M Cooks, Arlando Cooks, Elizabeth DeWitt, Kenneth Gossip, Sr, Kennice Gossip, Pamela Hensley, Robert G Holliness, Carolyn Latham Holub, Sharon Taylor, Brandi Jewell, Tracy Karp, David Patterson, Ronnie Phillips, James Roberts, Luz Ann Roberts, Kimberly Dawn Underwood, Marilyn Whitaker, William "Troy&q Wilson, James Douglas Booker, Lowry Briley, Twilah Brown, Willie B. Booker, Venisia Booker McGuire. (Wilson, Jeremy)
April 5, 2007 Filing 30 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Barry Rodney Davidson for Acxiom Corporation.(FEE PAID) (ch, )
April 5, 2007 Filing 29 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Chex Systems, Inc. identifying eFunds Corporation as Corporate Parent. (Greenspan, Alan)
March 26, 2007 Filing 28 MOTION to Stay contained in 26 MOTION to Dismiss or in the alternative to Stay by Chex Systems, Inc. (mpv, )
March 26, 2007 Filing 27 Additional Attachments to Main Document: 26 MOTION to Dismiss or in the alternative to Stay.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit !# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5# 6 Exhibit 6# 7 Exhibit 7)(Greenspan, Alan)
March 26, 2007 Filing 26 MOTION to Dismiss or in the alternative to Stay by Chex Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Greenspan, Alan)
March 23, 2007 Filing 25 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alan Neil Greenspan on behalf of Chex Systems, Inc. (Greenspan, Alan)
March 14, 2007 Filing 24 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joseph Hanson Malley on behalf of all plaintiffs (Malley, Joseph)
March 12, 2007 Filing 23 REPLY to Response to Motion re 15 First MOTION for Default Judgment as to Chex Systems, Inc., ChoicePoint Public Records Database Technologies, Inc., ChoicePoint Public Records, Inc., ChoicePoint, Inc., ChoicePoint Services, Inc., Seisint, Inc., and LexisNexis, Reed Elsevier, Inc.
March 12, 2007 Filing 22 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 19 Amended MOTION to Dismiss, 7 Joint MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by James D Clary, Sharon A Clary, Alice M Cooks, Arlando Cooks, Elizabeth DeWitt, Kenneth Gossip, Sr, Kennice Gossip, Pamela Hensley, Robert G Holliness, Carolyn Latham Holub, Sharon Taylor, Brandi Jewell, Tracy Karp, David Patterson, Ronnie Phillips, James Roberts, Luz Ann Roberts, Kimberly Dawn Underwood, Marilyn Whitaker, William "Troy&q Wilson, James Douglas Booker, Lowry Briley, Twilah Brown, Willie B. Booker, Venisia Booker McGuire. (Wilson, Jeremy)
March 5, 2007 Filing 21 REPLY to Response to Motion re 19 Amended MOTION to Dismiss filed by Choicepoint Public Records Inc, Choicepoint, Inc, ChoicePoint Services, Inc, Seisint, Inc, Lexisnexis, Reed Elsevier, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 to Reply Brief in Support of Amended Joint Motion to Dismiss)(Butts, George)
March 5, 2007 Filing 20 RESPONSE in Opposition re 15 First MOTION for Default Judgment as to Chex Systems, Inc., ChoicePoint Public Records Database Technologies, Inc., ChoicePoint Public Records, Inc., ChoicePoint, Inc., ChoicePoint Services, Inc., Seisint, Inc., and LexisNexis, Reed Elsevier, Inc.
March 5, 2007 Filing 19 Amended MOTION to Dismiss by Choicepoint Public Records Inc, Choicepoint, Inc, ChoicePoint Services, Inc, Seisint, Inc, Lexisnexis, Reed Elsevier, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Amended Joint Motion to Dismiss# 2 Exhibit 1 to Exhibit A# 3 Exhibit 2 to Exhibit A# 4 Exhibit 3 to Exhibit A# 5 Text of Proposed Order for Amended Joint Motion to Dismiss)(Butts, George)
March 1, 2007 Filing 18 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James Mark Mann on behalf of all plaintiffs (Mann, James)
February 28, 2007 Filing 17 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William Bradley Coffey on behalf of Choicepoint Public Records Database Tech Inc, Choicepoint Public Records Inc, Choicepoint, Inc, ChoicePoint Services, Inc (Coffey, William)
February 28, 2007 Filing 16 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David J Beck on behalf of Choicepoint Public Records Database Tech Inc, Choicepoint Public Records Inc, Choicepoint, Inc, ChoicePoint Services, Inc (Beck, David)
February 23, 2007 Filing 15 First MOTION for Default Judgment as to Chex Systems, Inc., ChoicePoint Public Records Database Technologies, Inc., ChoicePoint Public Records, Inc., ChoicePoint, Inc., ChoicePoint Services, Inc., Seisint, Inc., and LexisNexis, Reed Elsevier, Inc. by James D Clary, Sharon A Clary, Alice M Cooks, Arlando Cooks, Elizabeth DeWitt, Kenneth Gossip, Sr, Kennice Gossip, Pamela Hensley, Robert G Holliness, Carolyn Latham Holub, Sharon Taylor, Brandi Jewell, Tracy Karp, David Patterson, Ronnie Phillips, James Roberts, Luz Ann Roberts, Kimberly Dawn Underwood, Marilyn Whitaker, William "Troy&q Wilson, James Douglas Booker, Lowry Briley, Twilah Brown, Willie B. Booker, Venisia Booker McGuire. Responses due by 3/12/2007 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wilson, Jeremy)
February 23, 2007 Filing 14 RESPONSE to Motion re 7 Joint MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint or, Alternatively to Stay Plaintiffs' Action filed by James D Clary, Sharon A Clary, Alice M Cooks, Arlando Cooks, Elizabeth DeWitt, Kenneth Gossip, Sr, Kennice Gossip, Pamela Hensley, Robert G Holliness, Carolyn Latham Holub, Sharon Taylor, Brandi Jewell, Tracy Karp, David Patterson, Ronnie Phillips, James Roberts, Luz Ann Roberts, Kimberly Dawn Underwood, Marilyn Whitaker, William "Troy&q Wilson, James Douglas Booker, Lowry Briley, Twilah Brown, Willie B. Booker, Venisia Booker McGuire. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3)(Wilson, Jeremy)
February 19, 2007 Filing 13 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Acxiom Corporation.(Kelley, James)
February 16, 2007 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Chex Systems, Inc. (ehs, )
February 15, 2007 Filing 12 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sharon Taylor. ChoicePoint Services, Inc served on 1/23/2007, answer due 2/12/2007. (ch, )
February 15, 2007 Filing 11 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sharon Taylor. Choicepoint Public Records Inc served on 1/23/2007, answer due 2/12/2007. (ch, )
February 15, 2007 Filing 10 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sharon Taylor. Choicepoint Public Records Database Tech Inc served on 1/23/2007, answer due 2/12/2007. (ch, )
February 15, 2007 Filing 9 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sharon Taylor. Lexisnexis, Reed Elsevier, Inc served on 1/23/2007, answer due 2/12/2007. (ch, )
February 14, 2007 Filing 8 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Douglas Booker, Lowry Briley, Twilah Brown, Willie B. Booker. Acxiom Corporation served on 1/18/2007, answer due 2/19/2007. (ehs, )
February 8, 2007 Filing 7 Joint MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint by Choicepoint Public Records Inc, Choicepoint, Inc, ChoicePoint Services, Inc, Seisint, Inc, Lexisnexis, Reed Elsevier, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Affidavit of Ronald I. Raether, Jr. in Support of Joint Motion to Dismiss# 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Affidavit of Ronald I. Raether, Jr.# 3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Affidavit of Ronald I. Raether, Jr.# 4 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to Affidavit of Ronald I. Raether, Jr.# 5 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order re: Joint Motion to Dismiss)(Butts, George)
February 8, 2007 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Acxiom Corporation to 2/19/2007. (ch, )
February 8, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting 5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Acxiom Corp. shall have until 2/19/07 to answer . Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 2/8/07. (ch, )
February 7, 2007 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,, (Unopposed) by Acxiom Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kelley, James)
February 2, 2007 Filing 4 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sharon Taylor. Seisint, Inc served by Process Server on 1/19/2007, answer due 2/8/2007. (ch, )
January 30, 2007 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT FIRST against all defendants, filed by Willie B. Booker, Venisia Booker McGuire, James D Clary, Sharon A Clary, Alice M Cooks, Arlando Cooks, Elizabeth DeWitt, Kenneth Gossip, Sr, Kennice Gossip, Pamela Hensley, Robert G Holliness, Carolyn Latham Holub, Sharon Taylor, Brandi Jewell, Tracy Karp, David Patterson, Ronnie Phillips, James Roberts, Luz Ann Roberts, Kimberly Dawn Underwood, Marilyn Whitaker, William "Troy&q Wilson, James Douglas Booker, Lowry Briley, Twilah Brown.(Wilson, Jeremy)
January 11, 2007 Filing 2 NOTICE by James D Clary, Sharon A Clary, Alice M Cooks, Arlando Cooks, Elizabeth DeWitt, Kenneth Gossip, Sr, Kennice Gossip, Pamela Hensley, Robert G Holliness, Carolyn Latham Holub, Sharon Taylor, Brandi Jewell, Tracy Karp, David Patterson, Ronnie Phillips, James Roberts, Luz Ann Roberts, Kimberly Dawn Underwood, Marilyn Whitaker, William "Troy&q Wilson, James Douglas Booker, Lowry Briley, Twilah Brown of Attorney Appearance by Jeremy R. Wilson (Corea, Thomas)
January 8, 2007 Filing fee: $ 350.00, receipt number 2-1-2190 (ch, )
January 8, 2007 Filing fee: $ 350., receipt number 2-1-2190 (poa, )
January 4, 2007 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Acxiom Corporation, Choicepoint Public Records Database Tech Inc, Choicepoint Public Records Inc, Choicepoint, Inc, ChoicePoint Services, Inc, Seisint, Inc, Lexisnexis, Reed Elsevier, Inc. (ch, )
January 4, 2007 Filing 1 COMPLAINT CLASS ACTION against all defendants, filed by James D Clary, Sharon A Clary, Alice M Cooks, Arlando Cooks, Elizabeth DeWitt, Kenneth Gossip, Sr, Kennice Gossip, Pamela Hensley, Robert G Holliness, Carolyn Latham Holub, Sharon Taylor, Brandi Jewell, Tracy Karp, David Patterson, Ronnie Phillips, James Roberts, Luz Ann Roberts, Kimberly Dawn Underwood, Marilyn Whitaker, William "Troy&q Wilson, James Douglas Booker, Lowry Briley, Twilah Brown.(Corea, Thomas) Civil Cover Sheet added on 1/4/2007 (mpv, ). Modified on 1/4/2007 (mpv, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor et al v. Acxiom Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Taylor
Represented By: Jeremy Reade Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Douglas Booker
Represented By: Jeremy Reade Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lowry Briley
Represented By: Jeremy Reade Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Twilah Brown
Represented By: Jeremy Reade Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James D Clary
Represented By: Jeremy Reade Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon A Clary
Represented By: Jeremy Reade Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alice M Cooks
Represented By: Jeremy Reade Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arlando Cooks
Represented By: Jeremy Reade Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth DeWitt
Represented By: Jeremy Reade Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Gossip, Sr
Represented By: Jeremy Reade Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kennice Gossip
Represented By: Jeremy Reade Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Hensley
Represented By: Jeremy Reade Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert G Holliness
Represented By: Jeremy Reade Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn Latham Holub
Represented By: Jeremy Reade Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandi Jewell
Represented By: Jeremy Reade Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy Karp
Represented By: Jeremy Reade Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Patterson
Represented By: Jeremy Reade Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronnie Phillips
Represented By: Jeremy Reade Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Roberts
Represented By: Jeremy Reade Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luz Ann Roberts
Represented By: Jeremy Reade Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Dawn Underwood
Represented By: Jeremy Reade Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marilyn Whitaker
Represented By: Jeremy Reade Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William "Troy&q Wilson
Represented By: Jeremy Reade Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie B. Booker
Represented By: Jeremy Reade Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Venisia Booker McGuire
Represented By: Jeremy Reade Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acxiom Corporation
Represented By: James Patrick Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Choicepoint Public Records Database Tech Inc
Represented By: William Bradley Coffey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Choicepoint Public Records Inc
Represented By: William Bradley Coffey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Choicepoint, Inc
Represented By: William Bradley Coffey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ChoicePoint Services, Inc
Represented By: William Bradley Coffey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seisint, Inc
Represented By: George Barton Butts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lexisnexis, Reed Elsevier, Inc
Represented By: George Barton Butts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chex Systems, Inc.
Represented By: James M Walls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?