Minerva Industries, Inc. v. Motorola, Inc. et al Featured Case

Plaintiff alleges that defendants infringed on U.S. Patent No. 6,681,120 entitled "Mobile Entertainment and Communication Device."

Plaintiff: Minerva Industries, Inc.
Defendant: Motorola, Inc., Nokia, Inc., AT & T Mobility, LLC., Dobson Cellular Systems Inc, Helio, LLC, Hewlett-Packard Company, MetroPCS Wireless, Inc., Southernlinc Wireless, T-Mobile USA, Tracfone Wireless, Inc., U.S. Cellular Wireless, Virgin Mobil USA, LLC, HTC America, Inc.,, Kyocera Wireless Corporation, Kyocera America, Inc., LG Electronics Mobilecomm USA., Inc.,, Palm, Inc.,, Pantech Wireless, Inc., Sanyo North America Corporation, Utstarcom, Inc.,, Sony Ericsson Communications, (USA), Inc., Samsung America, Inc., Alltel Communication, Inc., HELIO LLC, Kyocera Wireless Corp., LG Electronics MobileComm USA, Inc., Nokia Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc., Alltel Communications, Inc., Virgin Mobile USA, LP and High Tech Computer Corp.
Counter Claimant: Sony Ericsson Communications, (USA), Inc., Utstarcom, Inc.,, Hewlett-Packard Company, Palm, Inc.,, Pantech Wireless, Inc., Alltel Communications, Inc., Virgin Mobile USA, LP, AT & T Mobility, LLC., Dobson Cellular Systems Inc, MetroPCS Wireless, Inc., HELIO LLC, Kyocera Wireless Corp., LG Electronics MobileComm USA, Inc., Nokia Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc., Tracfone Wireless, Inc. and Motorola, Inc.
Counter Defendant: Minerva Industries, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2007cv00229
Filed: June 6, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Marshall Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: T. John Ward
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 621 ORDER granting 620 Motion to Dismiss of all claims and counterclaimswith prejudice asserted between Plaintiff, MINERVA INDUSTRIES, INC., and Defendant, PANTECH WIRELESS, INC., the Stipulated Motion for Dismissal is GRANTED. All claims and counterclaims asserted in this suit between Plaintiff and Defendant are hereby dismissed with prejudice. All attorneys fees and costs are to be borne by the Party that incurred them. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 8/2/10. (ehs, )
July 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 620 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Pantech Wireless, Inc. by Minerva Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fenster, Marc)
June 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 619 NOTICE by Hewlett-Packard Company Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (Ainsworth, Charles)
June 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 618 Sealed Document - Dft's Brief in Response to Minerva Industries Inc Briefs on Tax Treaty Issues (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Brief, # 2 Exhibit Supplemental Declaration of Jae-Jin (Jay) Shim, # 3 Exhibit D to the Supplemental Declaration of Jae-Jin (Jay) Shim)(Williams, Fred) Modified on 6/18/2010 (ch, ).
June 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 617 ORDER granting 615 Motion to Dismiss all claims with prejudice andall counterclaims as moot asserted between Plaintiff and Counterclaim Defendant Minerva Industries, Inc. (Minerva) and Defendant and Counterclaim Plaintiff Palm, Inc. (Palm). All attorneys fees and costs are to be borne by the Party that incurred them. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/10/10. (ehs, )
June 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 616 ORDER granting 614 Motion for Leave to File a Response to Plaintiffs Tax Briefing (Motion). Defendants Samsung TelecommunicationsAmerica LLC and LG Electronics MobileComm USA, Inc. are granted leave to file a response to Plaintiff Minerva Industries, Inc.s briefing on the tax withholding issues within five (5) business days of the date this Order is entered. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/10/10. (ehs, )
June 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 615 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Defendant and Counterclaim Plaintiff Palm, Inc. by Minerva Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fenster, Marc)
June 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 614 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File a Response to Plaintiff's Tax Briefing by LG Electronics MobileComm USA, Inc., Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Fred)
June 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 613 ORDER granting 612 Stipulation of Motion for Dismissal as to all claims with prejudice and all counterclaims as moot as asserted between the Plaintiff/Counterclaim Defendant Minerva Industries, Inc. and Defendant/Counterclaim Plaintiff Hewlett-Packard Company. All attorneys' fees and costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on June 9, 2010. (jml)
June 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 612 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice Defendant and Counterclaim Plaintiff Hewlett-Packard Company by Minerva Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fenster, Marc)
June 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 611 ORDER granting 609 Sealed Motion for Leave to file Response to Dft's Brief on Settlement Related Tax Issues. ORDERED THAT Minerva is granted leave to file the Response attached to its Motion as Exhibit A. Pursuant to L.R. CV-7(k), the Response is deemed filed as of 6/3/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/8/2010. (ch, )
June 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 610 NOTICE by Minerva Industries, Inc. re 609 Opposed SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Response to Defendant Samsung's and LG's Brief on Settlement Tax Issues (Fenster, Marc)
June 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 609 Opposed SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Response to Defendant Samsung's and LG's Brief on Settlement Tax Issues by Minerva Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Fenster, Marc)
June 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 608 ORDER denying 599 Motion for Extension of Time for taking the deposition of shareholder James Koo. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/2/2010. (ch, )
May 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 607 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document (Declaration of Fred Williams is main document): 606 Sealed Document,,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to the Declaration of Fred Williams, # 2 Exhibit B to the Declaration of Fred Williams, # 3 Exhibit C to the Declaration of Fred Williams, # 4 Exhibit D to the Declaration of Fred Williams, # 5 Exhibit E Part 1 of 2 to the Declaration of Fred Williams, # 6 Exhibit E Part 2 of 2 to the Declaration of Fred Williams, # 7 Exhibit F to the Declaration of Fred Williams, # 8 Exhibit G to the Declaration of Fred Williams, # 9 Exhibit H to the Declaration of Fred Williams, # 10 Exhibit I to the Declaration of Fred Williams, # 11 Exhibit J to the Declaration of Fred Williams, # 12 Exhibit K to the Declaration of Fred Williams, # 13 Exhibit L to the Declaration of Fred Williams, # 14 Exhibit M Part 1 of 3 to the Declaration of Fred Williams, # 15 Exhibit M Part 2 of 3 to the Declaration of Fred Williams, # 16 Exhibit M Part 3 of 3 to the Declaration of Fred Williams, # 17 Exhibit N to the Declaration of Fred Williams, # 18 Exhibit O to the Declaration of Fred Williams, # 19 Exhibit P to the Declaration of Fred Williams, # 20 Exhibit Q to the Declaration of Fred Williams, # 21 Exhibit R to the Declaration of Fred Williams)(Williams, Fred) Modified on 6/1/2010 (sm, ).
May 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 606 Sealed Document (Dfts Brief on settlement issues). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of Sanghoon Jin, # 2 Exhibit A to the Declaration of Sanghoon Jin, # 3 Exhibit B to the Declaration of Sanghoon Jin, # 4 Exhibit C to the Declaration of Sanghoon Jin, # 5 Exhibit D to the Declaration of Sanghoon Jin, # 6 Exhibit E to the Declaration of Sanghoon Jin, # 7 Exhibit Declaration of Jae-Jin (Jay) Shim, # 8 Exhibit A to the Declaration of Jae-Jin (Jay) Shim, # 9 Exhibit B to the Declaration of Jae-Jin (Jay) Shim, # 10 Exhibit C to the Declaration of Jae-Jin (Jay) Shim, # 11 Exhibit Declaration of Kyung-Keunl (Kristen) Choi, # 12 Exhibit A to the Declaration of Kyung-Keunl (Kristen) Choi)(Williams, Fred) Modified on 6/1/2010 (sm, ).
May 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 605 NOTICE by Minerva Industries, Inc. re 601 Sealed Additional Attachments to Main Document, 604 Sealed Additional Attachments to Main Document, 602 Sealed Additional Attachments to Main Document, 600 Sealed Document, 603 Sealed Additional Attachments to Main Document (Fenster, Marc)
May 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 604 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 600 Sealed Document. Additional Exhibits to Hoffman Declaration (1) Exhibit B, (2) Exhibit C, (3) Exhibit D, (4) Exhibit E, (5) Exhibit F, (6) Exhibit G, (7) Exhibit H, (8) Exhibit I, (9) Exhibit J(Fenster, Marc)
May 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 603 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 600 Sealed Document. DECLARATION OF ADAM HOFFMAN (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, PART 1, # 2 Exhibit A, PART 2, # 3 Exhibit A, PART 3, # 4 Exhibit A, PART 4)(Fenster, Marc)
May 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 602 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 600 Sealed Document. Exhibit 2 to Minerva's Submission on Tax Withholding Issue (Fenster, Marc)
May 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 601 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to 600 Sealed Document:. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Fenster, Marc) Modified on 6/1/2010 (sm, ).
May 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 600 Sealed Document. Plaintiff Minerva Industries, Inc.'s Submission on Tax Withholding Issue (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Larry C. Russ, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Fenster, Marc)
May 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 599 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery for Taking the Deposition of Minerva Shareholder James Koo by Kyocera Wireless Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Fred)
May 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 598 ORDER granting 597 Motion for determination by the Court of Tax withholding issues. the Moving Parties shall submit briefs to this Court on the aforementioned issues by May 28, 2010. The Court shall decide these issues as soon as possible thereafter. Upon receipt of this Courts decision, the Moving Parties will close their settlements within five (5) business days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 5/26/10. (ehs, )
May 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 597 Joint MOTION for Determination of Tax Withholding Issues by Minerva Industries, Inc.. (Fenster, Marc) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/25/2010: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (ch, ).
May 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 596 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of EMERGENCY MOTION TO COMPEL TELEPHONIC HEARING held on 4/30/10 before Judge Chad Everingham. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR,Telephone number: (903) 663-5082. (21 Pages)NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/14/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/24/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/20/2010. (tja, )
May 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 595 ORDER granting 593 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Minerva Industries, Inc. as to deft Research In Motion Corporation. All claims and counterclaims dismissed with prejudice. All attoreys' fees and costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 5/18/10. (ehs, )
May 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 594 ORDER granting 513 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. ORDERED THAT the 4/23/2010 discovery deadline is extended until 5/31/2010 for the purpose of allowing defendants to take the deposition of Minerva Industries, Inc. shareholder James Koo. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 5/18/2010. (ch, )
May 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 593 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice as to Defendant Research In Motion Corporation by Minerva Industries, Inc., Research In Motion Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chassman, Peter)
May 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 592 ORDER granting 589 Motion to Stay. ORDERED that all deadlines in the present case with respect to Pantech and all deadlines of Minerva with respect to Pantech are stayed, pending a motion to dismiss. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all attorneys fees, costs of court and expenses shall be borne by each party incurring the same. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 5/12/2010. (ch, )
May 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 591 ORDER granting 588 Motion to Dismiss. All claims and counterclaims asserted between plaintiff and Dft Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications (USA) Inc are hereby dismissed with prejudice. All attorneys fees and costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 5/12/2010. (ch, )
May 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 589 Joint MOTION to Stay Deadlines Pending Finalization of Settlement Agreement with Defendant Pantech Wireless, Inc. by Minerva Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hoffman, Adam)
May 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 588 Joint MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice Defendant Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications (USA) Inc. by Minerva Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fenster, Marc)
May 11, 2010 Opinion or Order ***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY - ATTORNEY WILL REFILE Document # 587, Joint Motion to Dismiss. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
May 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 587 ***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY. PLEASE IGNORE.***Joint MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice Defendants Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications (USA) Inc. and Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications AB by Minerva Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fenster, Marc) Modified on 5/11/2010 (ch, ).
May 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 586 ORDER granting 584 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. The deadline for Minerva and Pantech to serve pretrial disclosures is extended until May 11, 2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 5/11/10. (ehs, )
May 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 585 ORDER granting 583 Motion to Stay. All deadlines in the present case with respect to Samsung, LG and Kyocera and all deadlines of Minerva with respect to Samsung, LG and Kyocera are stayed until June 7, 2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 5/11/10. (ehs, )
May 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 584 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery re Deadline to Serve Pretrial Disclosures by Minerva Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hoffman, Adam)
May 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 583 Joint MOTION to Stay All Deadlines Pending Determination of Settlement Issues re Minerva, Samsung, LG and Kyocera by Minerva Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fenster, Marc)
May 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 582 NOTICE by Pantech Wireless, Inc. re 553 Sixth MOTION in Limine Notice of Non-Opposition to Defendant Pantech Wireless, Inc.'s Motion in Limine No. 6 (Smith, Melissa)
May 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 581 ORDER granting 580 Motion to provide exhibit lists and designations of witnesses whose testimony will be presented by means of a deposition. Deadline is extended until May 10, 2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 5/10/10. (ehs, )
May 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 590 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Brian Sherwood Seal for Pantech Wireless, Inc.,Brian Sherwood Seal for Pantech Wireless, Inc.,Brian Sherwood Seal for Pantech Wireless, Inc.,Brian Sherwood Seal for Pantech Wireless, Inc.,Brian Sherwood Seal for Pantech Wireless, Inc.(RECEIPT 2-1-5354) (rml, )
May 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 580 Unopposed MOTION To Extend Deadline to Serve Deposition Designations and Exhibit Lists Until May 10, 2010 by Kyocera Wireless Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Fred)
May 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 579 NOTICE by Minerva Industries, Inc. re 577 SEALED MOTION Minerva Motions In Limine Nos. 1 through 12, 578 SEALED MOTION Minerva Motions In Limine Nos. 13 through 24 (Lee, Irene)
May 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 578 SEALED MOTION Minerva Motions In Limine Nos. 13 through 24 by Minerva Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lee, Irene)
May 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 577 SEALED MOTION Minerva Motions In Limine Nos. 1 through 12 by Minerva Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Lee, Irene)
May 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 576 Opposed MOTION in Limine Nos. 9-37 by Kyocera Wireless Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Fred)
May 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 575 Opposed MOTION in Limine No. 8: Motion to Exclude Evidence of Convoyed Sales by Kyocera Wireless Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Fred)
May 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 574 Opposed MOTION in Limine No. 7: Motion to Exclude Evidence of Kyocera's Size, Wealth or Revenues by Kyocera Wireless Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Fred)
May 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 573 Opposed MOTION in Limine No. 6: Motion to Exclude Mention of Kyocera's Geographic Location by Kyocera Wireless Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Fred)
May 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 572 Opposed MOTION in Limine No. 5: Motion to Exclude License Agreements Involving Entities Not a Party to This Case by Kyocera Wireless Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Fred)
May 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 571 Opposed MOTION in Limine No. 4: Motion to Exclude Testimony from a Witness Regarding Prior Relationships with Kyocera, Other Defendants, or the Defendants' Legal Representatives by Kyocera Wireless Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Fred)
May 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 570 Opposed MOTION in Limine No. 3: Motion to Preclude Minerva from Mentioning the Lack of an Opinion of Counsel by Kyocera Wireless Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Fred)
May 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 569 Opposed MOTION in Limine No. 2: Motion to Exclude any Reference by Minerva to Kyocera's Pre-Issuance Conduct, Including Communications with Minerva by Kyocera Wireless Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Fred)
May 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 568 Opposed MOTION in Limine No. 1: Motion to Admit Evidence Regarding the Reexaminations and Rejections of the Patents-in-Suit by Kyocera Wireless Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Fred)
May 7, 2010 Opinion or Order ***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY - ATTORNEY WILL REFILE Document # 555, Motion in Limine. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
May 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 567 Additional Attachments to Main Document:(CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE) 552 Fifth MOTION in Limine, 551 Fourth MOTION in Limine, 549 Second MOTION in Limine, 554 Seventh MOTION in Limine, 550 Third MOTION in Limine, 548 First MOTION in Limine, 553 Sixth MOTION in Limine.. (Smith, Melissa) Modified on 5/7/2010 (ch, ).
May 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 566 ORDER granting 545 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Dft Pantech Wireless Inc deadline is extended to 5/8/2010 to file its Pretrial Disclosures. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 5/7/2010. (ch, )
May 7, 2010 Opinion or Order ***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 557 - 565, Motions in Limine. PLEASE IGNORE. ATTORNEY TO REFILE*** (ehs, )
May 7, 2010 Opinion or Order NOTICE FROM CLERK - clerk modified text on Document # 555 to show Attachment #2 as Exhibit instead of Errata, per request from the attorney (ch, )
May 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 565 ***FILED IN ERROR. ATTORNEY TO REFILE*** MOTION re 557 Opposed MOTION in Limine Kyocera's Brief in Support of its Motion in Limine No. 31: to Admit Evidence regarding the Reexaminations and Rejections of the Patents-in-Suit by Kyocera Wireless Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Williams, Fred) Modified on 5/7/2010 (ehs, ).
May 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 564 ***FILED IN ERROR. ATTORNEY TO REFILE*** MOTION re 557 Opposed MOTION in Limine Kyocera's Brief in Support of its Motion in Limine No. 14: to Exclude License Agreements Involving Entities Not a Party to This Case by Kyocera Wireless Corp.. (Williams, Fred) Modified on 5/7/2010 (ehs, ).
May 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 563 ***FILED IN ERROR. ATTORNEY TO REFILE*** MOTION re 557 Opposed MOTION in Limine Kyocera's Brief in Support of its Motion in Limine No. 29: to Exclude Evidence of Convoyed Sales by Kyocera Wireless Corp.. (Williams, Fred) Modified on 5/7/2010 (ehs, ).
May 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 562 ***FILED IN ERROR. ATTORNEY TO REFILE*** MOTION re 557 Opposed MOTION in Limine Kyocera's Brief in Support of its Motion in Limine No. 32: to Preclude Minerva from Mentioning the Lack of Opinion of Counsel by Kyocera Wireless Corp.. (Williams, Fred) Modified on 5/7/2010 (ehs, ).
May 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 561 ***FILED IN ERROR. ATTORNEY TO REFILE*** MOTION re 557 Opposed MOTION in Limine Kyocera's Brief in Support of its Motion in Limine No. 33: to Exclude Testimony from a Witness Regarding Prior Relationships with Kyocera, other Defendants, or the Defendants' Legal Representatives by Kyocera Wireless Corp.. (Williams, Fred) Modified on 5/7/2010 (ehs, ).
May 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 560 ***FILED IN ERROR. ATTORNEY TO REFILE*** MOTION re 557 Opposed MOTION in Limine Kyocera's Brief in Support of its Motion in Limine No. 27: to Exclude Any Reference by Minerva to Kyocera's Pre-Issuance Conduct, Including Communications with Minerva by Kyocera Wireless Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Williams, Fred) Modified on 5/7/2010 (ehs, ).
May 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 559 ***FILED IN ERROR. ATTORNEY TO REFILE MOTION re 557 Opposed MOTION in Limine Kyocera's Brief in Support of its Motion in Limine No. 6: to Exclude Mention of Kyocera's Geographic Location by Kyocera Wireless Corp.. (Williams, Fred) Modified on 5/7/2010 (ehs, ).
May 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 558 ***FILED IN ERROR. ATTORNEY TO REFILE***MOTION re 557 Opposed MOTION in Limine Kyocera's Brief in Support of its Motion in Limine No. 7: to Exclude Evidence of Kyocera's Size, Wealth or Revenues by Kyocera Wireless Corp.. (Williams, Fred) Modified on 5/7/2010 (ehs, ).
May 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 557 <b.***FILED IN ERROR. ATTORNEY TO REFILE***Opposed MOTION in Limine by Kyocera Wireless Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Fred) Modified on 5/7/2010 (ehs, ).
May 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 556 NOTICE by Minerva Industries, Inc. re 555 SEALED MOTION Minerva Motions In Limine Nos. 1 through 24 (Lee, Irene)
May 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 555 ***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY. PLEASE IGNORE.*** SEALED MOTION Minerva Motions In Limine Nos. 1 through 24 by Minerva Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Lee, Irene) Modified on 5/7/2010 (ch, ). Modified on 5/7/2010 (ch, ).
May 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 554 Seventh MOTION in Limine by Pantech Wireless, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
May 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 553 Sixth MOTION in Limine by Pantech Wireless, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
May 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 552 Fifth MOTION in Limine by Pantech Wireless, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
May 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 551 Fourth MOTION in Limine by Pantech Wireless, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
May 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 550 Third MOTION in Limine by Pantech Wireless, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
May 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 549 Second MOTION in Limine by Pantech Wireless, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
May 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 548 First MOTION in Limine by Pantech Wireless, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
May 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 547 NOTICE by Minerva Industries, Inc. re 546 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion (Lee, Irene)
May 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 546 SEALED SURREPLY to Response to Motion re 471 Alltel Defendants Second MOTION to Compel filed by Minerva Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B, # 2 Exhibit C)(Lee, Irene)
May 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 545 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Disclosures by Pantech Wireless, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
May 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 544 ORDER granting 537 Motion for Extension of Time to File its Joinder in Defendant Kyocera Wireless Corp.s Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 5/6/10. (ehs, )
May 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 543 NOTICE by Pantech Wireless, Inc. re 538 Opposed MOTION to Enforce the Court's Order Limiting the Number of Asserted Claims Notice of Defendant Pantech Wireless, Inc.'s Joinder in Defendant Kyocera Wireless Corp.'s Motion to Enforce the Court's Order Limiting the Number of Asserted Claims (Smith, Melissa)
May 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 542 Sealed Document. Defendant Pantech Wireless Inc.'s Notice of Joinder in Kyocera Wireless Corp.'s Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement (Attachments: #(1) Text of Proposed Order, #(2) Exhibit 1, #(3) Exhibit 2)(Smith, Melissa)
May 5, 2010 Opinion or Order ***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY Document # 541, Notice. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
May 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 541 ***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY. PLEASE IGNORE.***NOTICE by Pantech Wireless, Inc. re 530 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement Notice of Joinder in Kyocera Wireless Corp.'s Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2)(Smith, Melissa) Modified on 5/5/2010 (ch, ).
May 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 540 NOTICE by LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc., Samsung Telecommunications America LLC of Compliance with the Court's Order at April 30, 2010 Telephonic Motion Hearing (Williams, Fred)
May 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 539 NOTICE by Minerva Industries, Inc. of Compliance with Court's 4/30/10 Order (Fenster, Marc)
May 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 538 Opposed MOTION to Enforce the Court's Order Limiting the Number of Asserted Claims by Kyocera Wireless Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Fred)
May 5, 2010 Opinion or Order ***FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY. Document # 528, Motion. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ehs, )
May 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 537 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joinder in Defendant Kyocera Wireless Corp.'s Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement by Pantech Wireless, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
May 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 536 NOTICE by Pantech Wireless, Inc. re 528 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION to Enforce the Court's Order Limiting the Number of Asserted Claims Notice of Joinder in Defendant Kyocera Wireless Corp.'s Motion to Enforce the Court's Order Limiting the Number of Asserted Claims (Smith, Melissa)
May 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 535 NOTICE by Pantech Wireless, Inc. re 529 MOTION for Summary Judgment Notice of Joinder in Defendant Kyocera Wireless Corp.'s Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. 102(a) and (e) and 103 (Smith, Melissa)
May 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 534 NOTICE by Pantech Wireless, Inc. re 527 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment Against Minerva's Claim for Pre-Issuance Damages Notice of Joinder in Defendant Kyocera Wireless Corp.'s Motion for Summary Judgment Against Minerva's Claim for Pre-Issuance Damages (Smith, Melissa)
May 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 533 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham: Telephonic Motions Hearing held on 4/30/2010. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes.) (delat)
May 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 532 ORDER granting Defendant Kyocera Wireless Corp 526 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Amended Answer to Plaintiff's Consolidated Complaint and Consolidated Counterclaim. ORDER that the effective date of Defendant's Amended Answer to Plaintiff's Consolidated Complaint and Consolidated Counterclaim and the effective date of service to Plaintiff is the date this Order is entered. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 5/3/10. (poa, )
May 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 531 Additional Attachments to Main Document: EXHIBIT B to 529 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. (Williams, Fred) Modified on 5/5/2010 (ch, ).
May 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 530 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement by Kyocera Wireless Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Fred)
May 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 529 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Kyocera Wireless Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit C-1, # 3 Exhibit C-2, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit 1, # 8 Exhibit 2, # 9 Exhibit 3, # 10 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Fred)
May 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 528 ***FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY*** Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION to Enforce the Court's Order Limiting the Number of Asserted Claims by Kyocera Wireless Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Fred) Modified on 5/5/2010 (ehs, ).
May 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 527 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment Against Minerva's Claim for Pre-Issuance Damages by Kyocera Wireless Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Fred)
May 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 526 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer to Plaintiff's Consolidated Complaint And Consolidated Counterclaim by Kyocera Wireless Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Fred)
April 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 525 NOTICE by Hewlett-Packard Company Regarding Mediation (Geiszler, Steven)
April 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 524 ORDER granting 523 Motion to Stay. All deadlines in the present case with respect to Sanyo and all deadlines of Minerva with respect to Sanyo are stayed, pending a motion to dismiss. All attorneys fees, costs of court and expenses shall be borne by each party incurring the same. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 4/30/10. (ehs, )
April 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 523 Joint MOTION to Stay Deadlines Pending Finalization of Minerva and Sanyo North America Settlement Agreement by Minerva Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lee, Irene)
April 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 522 ORDER Setting a Conference call on 521 Emergency MOTION to Compel Minerva Industries, Inc. to Produce the Database and Software Relied Upon by Minervas Expert James Olivier, to Stay all Case Deadlines as to Defendants LG and Samsung, and to Extend the Deadline for the Parties to Exchange : CONFERENCE CALL set for 4/30/2010 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 4/29/10. (ehs, )
April 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 521 Emergency MOTION to Compel Minerva Industries, Inc. to Produce the Database and Software Relied Upon by Minervas Expert James Olivier, to Stay all Case Deadlines as to Defendants LG and Samsung, and to Extend the Deadline for the Parties to Exchange Exhibit Lists and Deposition Designations by Kyocera Wireless Corp., LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc., Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Fred)
April 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 520 ORDER granting 514 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. ORDERED THAT discovery deadline is extended until 5/5/2010, for the purpose of allowing the Akin Defendants to take the 30(b)(6) deposition of Minerva Industries, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 4/27/2010. (ch, )
April 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 519 ORDER granting 512 Motion to Stay deadlines. All deadlines in the present case with respect to RIM and all deadlines of Minerva with respect to RIM are stayed, pending a motion to dismiss. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all attorneys fees, costs of court and expenses shall be borne by each party incurring the same. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 4/27/2010. (ch, )
April 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 518 REPLY to Response to Motion re 471 Second MOTION to Compel filed by Kyocera Wireless Corp.. (Williams, Fred)
April 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 517 REPORT of Mediation by Robert Faulkner. Mediation result: Settled as to Defendant, Samsung(Faulkner, Robert)
April 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 516 REPORT of Mediation by Robert Faulkner. Mediation result: Settled as to Defendants, Sony, Sanyo and LG. The mediator is still working with Defendant, Kyocera toward a resolution.(Faulkner, Robert)
April 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 514 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery To Allow Akin Defendants to Take the 30(B)(6) Deposition of Minerva Industries, Inc. After the April 23, 2010 Discovery Deadline by Kyocera Wireless Corp., LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc., Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Fred)
April 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 513 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery to Allow Defendants to Take the Deposition of Minerva Shareholder James Koo After the April 23, 2010 Discovery Deadline by Kyocera Wireless Corp., LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc., Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Fred)
April 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 512 Joint MOTION to Stay Deadlines Pending Finalization of Settlement Agreement by Minerva Industries, Inc., Research In Motion Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chassman, Peter)
April 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 515 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Mark G Matuschak,Peter M Dichiara for Research In Motion Corporation,Mark G Matuschak,Peter M Dichiara for Research In Motion Corporation,Mark G Matuschak,Peter M Dichiara for Research In Motion Corporation,Mark G Matuschak,Peter M Dichiara for Research In Motion Corporation,Mark G Matuschak,Peter M Dichiara for Research In Motion Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 PHV P Dichiara Receipt 2-1-5314)(rml, )
April 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 511 ORDER withdrawing 506 Motion to Quash; granting 510 Motion to Withdraw to 506 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 4/21/2010. (ch, )
April 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 510 MOTION to Withdraw 506 Emergency MOTION to Quash Samsung Telecommunications USA LLCs and LG Electronics MobileComm-USA Inc.s Emergency Motion to Quash and for Protective Order Regarding Deposition Notices Purportedly Served by Plaintiff Minerva Industries, Inc. by LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc., Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
April 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 509 ORDER - that plaintiffs Minerva Industries Incs deadline to respond to Dft Samsung Telecommunications USA LLC and LG Electronics Mobilecomm-USA's Emergency Motion to Quash and for Protective Order is 4/21/2010 at 12:00 pm. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 4/19/2010. (ch, )
April 16, 2010 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John D. Love: Telephone Conference held on 4/16/2010. (mjm, )
April 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 508 ORDER RE: "HOTLINE" HEARING PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE CV-26(g). Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 4/16/2010. (ch, )
April 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 507 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daymon Jeffrey Rambin on behalf of Minerva Industries, Inc. (Rambin, Daymon)
April 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 506 ***WITHDRAWN PER ORDER # 511 ***Emergency MOTION to Quash Samsung Telecommunications USA LLCs and LG Electronics MobileComm-USA Inc.s Emergency Motion to Quash and for Protective Order Regarding Deposition Notices Purportedly Served by Plaintiff Minerva Industries, Inc. by LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc., Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Fred) Modified on 4/21/2010 (ch, ).
April 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 505 ORDER granting 487 Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery - For Leave to Extend the Deadline Relating to Minerva's Expert Report Regarding Infringement filed by Minerva Industries, Inc. Minerva has until April 16, 2010 to serve claim charts as part of its experts report regarding infringement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 4/16/10. (ehs, )
April 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 504 RESPONSE to Motion re 487 Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery - For Leave to Extend the Deadline Relating to Minerva's Expert Report Regarding Infringement Defendants Response to Minervas Reply in Support of its Emergency Motion for Leave to Extend the Deadline Relating to Minervas Expert Report Regarding Infringement filed by AT & T Mobility, LLC., Alltel Communications Inc, Cellco Partnership, Dobson Cellular Systems Inc, HELIO LLC, Kyocera Wireless Corp., LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc., MetroPCS Wireless, Inc., Nextel Communications of Mid-Atlantic Inc, Nextel South Corp, Nextel West Corp, Nextel of California Inc, Nextel of New York Inc, Nextel of Texas Inc, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC, Sprint Spectrum L.P., T-Mobile USA, Inc., Tracfone Wireless, Inc., Virgin Mobile USA, LP. (Williams, Fred)
April 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 503 NOTICE by Minerva Industries, Inc. re 502 Sealed Response to Motion (Lee, Irene)
April 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 502 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 471 Second MOTION to Compel filed by Minerva Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Lee, Irene)
April 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 501 RESPONSE in Support re 487 Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery - For Leave to Extend the Deadline Relating to Minerva's Expert Report Regarding Infringement filed by Minerva Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of A. Giza, # 2 Affidavit Declaration of Olivier, # 3 Exhibit Exh1, # 4 Exhibit Exh2, # 5 Exhibit Exh3, # 6 Exhibit Exh4, # 7 Exhibit Exh5)(Hoffman, Adam)
April 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 500 NOTICE by Pantech Wireless, Inc. Notice of Service of Expert Reports (Smith, Melissa)
April 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 499 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Fred Irvin Williams on behalf of AT&T Mobility, LLC, Alltel Communications, LLC, Cellco Partnership, Dobson Cellular Systems, Inc., HELIO LLC, Kyocera Wireless Corp., LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc., MetroPCS Wireless, Inc., Nextel Communications of Mid-Atlantic Inc, Nextel South Corp, Nextel West Corp, Nextel of California Inc, Nextel of New York Inc, Nextel of Texas Inc, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC, Sprint Spectrum L.P., T-Mobile USA, Inc., Tracfone Wireless, Inc., Virgin Mobile USA, LP (Williams, Fred)
April 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 498 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Harry Lee Gillam, Jr on behalf of Research In Motion Corporation (Gillam, Harry)
April 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 497 ORDER granting 487 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. The court orders Minerva to file, by Thursday, April 15, 2010 at 5:00 p.m., any declarations, affidavits, or other evidence supporting its argument that technical issues prevented the timely service of its expert report. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 4/13/10. (ehs, )
April 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 496 ORDER granting 492 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jessica Lea Hannah terminated as counsel for pltf. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 4/13/10. (ehs, )
April 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 495 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrew D Weiss on behalf of Minerva Industries, Inc. (Weiss, Andrew)
April 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 494 NOTICE by Research In Motion Corporation of Service of Expert Reports (Chassman, Peter)
April 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 493 NOTICE by AT&T Mobility, LLC, Alltel Communications Inc, Cellco Partnership, Dobson Cellular Systems Inc, HELIO LLC, Kyocera Wireless Corp., LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc., MetroPCS Wireless, Inc., Nextel Communications of Mid-Atlantic Inc, Nextel South Corp, Nextel West Corp, Nextel of California Inc, Nextel of New York Inc, Nextel of Texas Inc, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC, Sprint Spectrum L.P., T-Mobile USA, Inc., Tracfone Wireless, Inc., Virgin Mobile USA, LP re 489 Sealed Response to Motion,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, Clarification Regarding Defendants' Response to Minerva's Emergency Motion for Leave to Extend the Deadline Relating to Minerva's Expert Report Regarding Infringement (Williams, Fred)
April 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 492 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Jessica L. Hannah by Minerva Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
April 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 491 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 467 MOTION to Limit the Number of Asserted Claims Against Defendants and to Strike Minerva's Improper and Untimely Addition of a Previously Unasserted Claim filed by Minerva Industries, Inc.. (DeRieux, Elizabeth)
April 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 490 NOTICE by Minerva Industries, Inc. of Service of Expert Reports (Giza, Alexander)
April 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 489 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 487 Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery - For Leave to Extend the Deadline Relating to Minerva's Expert Report Regarding Infringement filed by A T & T Mobility LLC, Alltel Communications Inc, Cellco Partnership, Dobson Cellular Systems Inc, HELIO LLC, Kyocera Wireless Corp., LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc., MetroPCS Wireless, Inc., Nextel Communications of Mid-Atlantic Inc, Nextel South Corp, Nextel West Corp, Nextel of California Inc, Nextel of New York Inc, Nextel of Texas Inc, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC, Sprint Spectrum L.P., T-Mobile USA, Inc., Tracfone Wireless, Inc., Virgin Mobile USA, LP. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Defense Counsel Who Participated In The April 9, 2010, Meet and Confer Regarding Minerva's Emergency Motion For Leave To Extend The Deadline Relating To Minerva's Expert Report Regarding Infringement, # 2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Defense Counsel Who Participated In The April 9, 2010, Meet and Confer Regarding Minerva's Emergency Motion For Leave To Extend The Deadline Relating To Minerva's Expert Report Regarding Infringement, # 3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Defense Counsel Who Participated In The April 9, 2010, Meet and Confer Regarding Minerva's Emergency Motion For Leave To Extend The Deadline Relating To Minerva's Expert Report Regarding Infringement, # 4 Exhibit C to Declaration of Defense Counsel Who Participated In The April 9, 2010, Meet and Confer Regarding Minerva's Emergency Motion For Leave To Extend The Deadline Relating To Minerva's Expert Report Regarding Infringement, # 5 Exhibit C (continued) to Declaration of Defense Counsel Who Participated In The April 9, 2010, Meet and Confer Regarding Minerva's Emergency Motion For Leave To Extend The Deadline Relating To Minerva's Expert Report Regarding Infringement, # 6 Exhibit C (continued) to Declaration of Defense Counsel Who Participated In The April 9, 2010, Meet and Confer Regarding Minerva's Emergency Motion For Leave To Extend The Deadline Relating To Minerva's Expert Report Regarding Infringement, # 7 Exhibit C (continued) to Declaration of Defense Counsel Who Participated In The April 9, 2010, Meet and Confer Regarding Minerva's Emergency Motion For Leave To Extend The Deadline Relating To Minerva's Expert Report Regarding Infringement, # 8 Exhibit C (continued) to Declaration of Defense Counsel Who Participated In The April 9, 2010, Meet and Confer Regarding Minerva's Emergency Motion For Leave To Extend The Deadline Relating To Minerva's Expert Report Regarding Infringement, # 9 Exhibit C (continued) to Declaration of Defense Counsel Who Participated In The April 9, 2010, Meet and Confer Regarding Minerva's Emergency Motion For Leave To Extend The Deadline Relating To Minerva's Expert Report Regarding Infringement, # 10 Exhibit C (continued) to Declaration of Defense Counsel Who Participated In The April 9, 2010, Meet and Confer Regarding Minerva's Emergency Motion For Leave To Extend The Deadline Relating To Minerva's Expert Report Regarding Infringement, # 11 Declaration of Ashley R. Adams In Support of Response to Minerva's Emergency Motion For Leave To Extend The Deadline Relating To Minerva's Expert Report Regarding Infringement, # 12 Exhibit A to Declaration of Ashley R. Adams In Support of Response to Minerva's Emergency Motion For Leave To Extend The Deadline Relating To Minerva's Expert Report Regarding Infringement, # 13 Exhibit B to Declaration of Ashley R. Adams In Support of Response to Minerva's Emergency Motion For Leave To Extend The Deadline Relating To Minerva's Expert Report Regarding Infringement, # 14 Exhibit C to Declaration of Ashley R. Adams In Support of Response to Minerva's Emergency Motion For Leave To Extend The Deadline Relating To Minerva's Expert Report Regarding Infringement, # 15 Exhibit D to Declaration of Ashley R. Adams In Support of Response to Minerva's Emergency Motion For Leave To Extend The Deadline Relating To Minerva's Expert Report Regarding Infringement, # 16 Exhibit E to Declaration of Ashley R. Adams In Support of Response to Minerva's Emergency Motion For Leave To Extend The Deadline Relating To Minerva's Expert Report Regarding Infringement, # 17 Exhibit F to Declaration of Ashley R. Adams In Support of Response to Minerva's Emergency Motion For Leave To Extend The Deadline Relating To Minerva's Expert Report Regarding Infringement, # 18 Exhibit G to Declaration of Ashley R. Adams In Support of Response to Minerva's Emergency Motion For Leave To Extend The Deadline Relating To Minerva's Expert Report Regarding Infringement, # 19 Exhibit H to Declaration of Ashley R. Adams In Support of Response to Minerva's Emergency Motion For Leave To Extend The Deadline Relating To Minerva's Expert Report Regarding Infringement, # 20 Exhibit I to Declaration of Ashley R. Adams In Support of Response to Minerva's Emergency Motion For Leave To Extend The Deadline Relating To Minerva's Expert Report Regarding Infringement, # 21 Exhibit J to Declaration of Ashley R. Adams In Support of Response to Minerva's Emergency Motion For Leave To Extend The Deadline Relating To Minerva's Expert Report Regarding Infringement, # 22 Exhibit K to Declaration of Ashley R. Adams In Support of Response to Minerva's Emergency Motion For Leave To Extend The Deadline Relating To Minerva's Expert Report Regarding Infringement, # 23 Exhibit L to Declaration of Ashley R. Adams In Support of Response to Minerva's Emergency Motion For Leave To Extend The Deadline Relating To Minerva's Expert Report Regarding Infringement, # 24 Exhibit M to Declaration of Ashley R. Adams In Support of Response to Minerva's Emergency Motion For Leave To Extend The Deadline Relating To Minerva's Expert Report Regarding Infringement, # 25 Exhibit N to Declaration of Ashley R. Adams In Support of Response to Minerva's Emergency Motion For Leave To Extend The Deadline Relating To Minerva's Expert Report Regarding Infringement, # 26 Exhibit O to Declaration of Ashley R. Adams In Support of Response to Minerva's Emergency Motion For Leave To Extend The Deadline Relating To Minerva's Expert Report Regarding Infringement, # 27 Exhibit P to Declaration of Ashley R. Adams In Support of Response to Minerva's Emergency Motion For Leave To Extend The Deadline Relating To Minerva's Expert Report Regarding Infringement, # 28 Exhibit Q to Declaration of Ashley R. Adams In Support of Response to Minerva's Emergency Motion For Leave To Extend The Deadline Relating To Minerva's Expert Report Regarding Infringement, # 29 Exhibit R to Declaration of Ashley R. Adams In Support of Response to Minerva's Emergency Motion For Leave To Extend The Deadline Relating To Minerva's Expert Report Regarding Infringement, # 30 Exhibit S to Declaration of Ashley R. Adams In Support of Response to Minerva's Emergency Motion For Leave To Extend The Deadline Relating To Minerva's Expert Report Regarding Infringement, # 31 Exhibit T to Declaration of Ashley R. Adams In Support of Response to Minerva's Emergency Motion For Leave To Extend The Deadline Relating To Minerva's Expert Report Regarding Infringement, # 32 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Fred)
April 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 488 NOTICE by A T & T Mobility LLC, Alltel Communications Inc, Cellco Partnership, Dobson Cellular Systems Inc, HELIO LLC, Kyocera Wireless Corp., LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc., MetroPCS Wireless, Inc., Nextel Communications of Mid-Atlantic Inc, Nextel South Corp, Nextel West Corp, Nextel of California Inc, Nextel of New York Inc, Nextel of Texas Inc, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC, Sprint Spectrum L.P., T-Mobile USA, Inc., Tracfone Wireless, Inc., Virgin Mobile USA, LP Alltel Defendants Notice of Service of Expert Reports (Landis, Todd)
April 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 487 Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery - For Leave to Extend the Deadline Relating to Minerva's Expert Report Regarding Infringement by Minerva Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lee, Irene)
April 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 486 NOTICE by Research In Motion Corporation regarding Service of Expert Report (Chassman, Peter)
April 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 485 NOTICE by Research In Motion Corporation of Request for Telephonic Hearing (Gillam, Harry)
April 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 484 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney David C Vondle for Alltel Communication, Inc.,David C Vondle for Alltel Communication, Inc.,David C Vondle for Alltel Communications Inc,David C Vondle for Alltel Communications, Inc.,David C Vondle for Alltel Communications, Inc.,David C Vondle for Alltel Communications, Inc.,David C Vondle for Alltel Communications, LLC,David C Vondle for Alltel Communications, LLC.RECEIPT 2-1-5292 (rml, )
April 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 483 NOTICE by Hewlett-Packard Company of Cancellation of Mediation (Ainsworth, Charles)
April 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 482 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas A Miller on behalf of Research In Motion Corporation (Miller, Thomas)
April 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 481 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Dustin James Edwards on behalf of Research In Motion Corporation (Edwards, Dustin)
April 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 480 REPLY to Response to Motion re 467 MOTION to Limit the Number of Asserted Claims Against Defendants and to Strike Minerva's Improper and Untimely Addition of a Previously Unasserted Claim filed by AT & T Mobility, LLC., Alltel Communication, Inc., Cellco Partnership, Dobson Cellular Systems Inc, HELIO LLC, Hewlett-Packard Company, Kyocera Wireless Corp., LG Electronics MobileComm USA, Inc., MetroPCS Wireless, Inc., Nextel Communications of Mid-Atlantic Inc, Nextel South Corp, Nextel West Corp, Nextel of California Inc, Nextel of New York Inc, Nextel of Texas Inc, Palm, Inc.,, Pantech Wireless, Inc., Research In Motion Corporation, Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC, Sanyo North America Corporation, Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications (USA), Inc., Sprint Spectrum L.P., T-Mobile USA, Inc., Tracfone Wireless, Inc., Verizon Wireless Services, LLC, Virgin Mobile USA, LP. (Chassman, Peter)
April 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 479 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediator - Hon. Robert Faulkner is hereby appointed as mediator in the above referenced case for mediation between the Plaintiff and Defendants Kyocera Wireless Corp., LG Electronics MobileComm U.S.A., Inc., Samsung Telecommunications America LLC, SANYO North America Corporation and Hewlett- Packard Company. The Court designates plaintiffs counsel to be responsible for timely contactingthe mediator and defendants counsel to coordinate a date for the mediation. Mediation shall becompleted by April 30, 2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 4/1/2010. (ch, )
April 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 478 NOTICE by Sony Ericsson Communications, (USA), Inc., Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications (USA), Inc. Sony Ericsson's Notice to the Court of Upcoming Mediation (Schulte, David)
March 31, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 477 NOTICE by Hewlett-Packard Company of Upcoming Mediation (Geiszler, Steven)
March 31, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 476 RESPONSE in Opposition re 467 MOTION to Limit the Number of Asserted Claims Against Defendants and to Strike Minerva's Improper and Untimely Addition of a Previously Unasserted Claim filed by Minerva Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Giza, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
March 31, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 475 NOTICE by Sanyo North America Corporation of Upcoming Mediation (Dorfman, Michael)
March 31, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 474 NOTICE by Kyocera Wireless Corp., LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc., Samsung Telecommunications America LLC Notice to the Court of Upcoming Mediations (Williams, Fred)
March 31, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 473 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediator Gary V McGowan. Mediation deadline is 4/30/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 3/31/2010. (ch, )
March 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 472 NOTICE by Research In Motion Corporation of Upcoming Mediation (Chassman, Peter)
March 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 471 Second MOTION to Compel by AT & T Mobility, LLC., Alltel Communications, LLC, Cellco Partnership, Dobson Cellular Systems, Inc., HELIO LLC, Kyocera Wireless Corp., LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc., MetroPCS Wireless, Inc., Nextel Communications of Mid-Atlantic Inc, Nextel South Corp, Nextel West Corp, Nextel of California Inc, Nextel of New York Inc, Nextel of Texas Inc, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC, Sprint Spectrum L.P., T-Mobile USA, Inc., Tracfone Wireless, Inc., Virgin Mobile USA, LP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Zager, Steven)
March 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 470 ORDER granting 468 Motion to expedite briefing. The plaintiff shall file its response to the defendants motion to limit the number of asserted claims (Dkt. No. 467) by March 31, 2010. The defendants may file a notice indicating that they waive their right to file a reply brief, and thus briefing on the defendants motion is complete. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 3/24/10. (ehs, )
March 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 469 ANSWER to Complaint Amended Counterclaims of Defendant Palm, Inc. (Doc 460) by Minerva Industries, Inc..(Lee, Irene)
March 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 468 MOTION for Expedited Briefing for Defendants' Motion to Limit the Number of Asserted Claims Against Defendants and to Strike Minerva's Improper and Untimely Addition of a Previously Unasserted Claim by AT & T Mobility, LLC., Alltel Communication, Inc., Alltel Communications, LLC, Cellco Partnership, Dobson Cellular Systems Inc, HELIO LLC, Hewlett-Packard Company, Kyocera Wireless Corp., LG Electronics MobileComm USA, Inc., MetroPCS Wireless, Inc., Nextel Communications of Mid-Atlantic Inc, Nextel South Corp, Nextel West Corp, Nextel of California Inc, Nextel of New York Inc, Nextel of Texas Inc, Palm, Inc.,, Pantech Wireless, Inc., Research In Motion Corporation, Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC, Sanyo North America Corporation, Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications (USA), Inc., Sprint Spectrum L.P., T-Mobile USA, Inc., Tracfone Wireless, Inc., Verizon Wireless Services, LLC, Virgin Mobile USA, LP. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chassman, Peter)
March 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 467 MOTION to Limit the Number of Asserted Claims Against Defendants and to Strike Minerva's Improper and Untimely Addition of a Previously Unasserted Claim by AT & T Mobility, LLC., Alltel Communications, Inc., Alltel Communications, LLC, Cellco Partnership, Dobson Cellular Systems Inc, HELIO LLC, Hewlett-Packard Company, Kyocera Wireless Corp., LG Electronics MobileComm USA, Inc., MetroPCS Wireless, Inc., Nextel Communications of Mid-Atlantic Inc, Nextel South Corp, Nextel West Corp, Nextel of California Inc, Nextel of New York Inc, Nextel of Texas Inc, Palm, Inc.,, Pantech Wireless, Inc., Research In Motion Corporation, Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC, Sanyo North America Corporation, Sony Ericsson Communications, (USA), Inc., Sprint Spectrum L.P., T-Mobile USA, Inc., Tracfone Wireless, Inc., Verizon Wireless Services, LLC, Virgin Mobile USA, LP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Text of Proposed Order)(Chassman, Peter)
March 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 466 ORDER granting 465 Motion for Leave to extend deadlines. Deadlines set forth herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 3/16/10. (ehs, )
March 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 465 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Joint Motion for Leave to Extend the Deadlines Relating to Expert Reports, Expert Discovery, and Dispositive and Daubert Motions by A T & T Mobility LLC, AT & T Mobility, LLC., AT&T Mobility, LLC, Alltel Communication, Inc., Alltel Communications Inc, Alltel Communications, Inc., Alltel Communications, LLC, Cellco Partnership, Dobson Cellular Systems Inc, Dobson Cellular Systems Inc., Dobson Cellular Systems, Inc., HELIO LLC, Hewlett-Packard Company, Kyocera Wireless Corp., Kyocera Wireless Corporation, LG Electronics MobileComm USA, Inc., LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc., LG Electronics Mobilecomm USA., Inc.,, MetroPCS Wireless, Inc., Minerva Industries, Inc., Nextel Communications of Mid-Atlantic Inc, Nextel South Corp, Nextel West Corp, Nextel of California Inc, Nextel of New York Inc, Nextel of Texas Inc, Palm, Inc., Palm, Inc.,, Pantech Wireless, Inc., Research In Motion Corporation, Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC, Sanyo North America Corporation, Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications (USA), Inc., Sprint Spectrum L.P., T-Mobile USA, T-Mobile USA, Inc., Tracfone Wireless, Inc., Virgin Mobile USA, LP. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chassman, Peter)
March 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 464 ORDER granting 458 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Thomas D. Fortenberry terminated as counsel for Alltel Communications, LLC f/k/a Alltel Communications, Inc.; AT&T Mobility, LLC; Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless;Dobson Cellular Systems, Inc.; HELIO LLC; Kyocera Wireless Corp.; LG Electronics MobileComm U.S.A., Inc.; MetroPCS Wireless, Inc.; Nextel Communications of the Mid-Atlantic, Inc.; Nextel of California, Inc.; Nextel of New York, Inc.; Nextel of Texas, Inc.; Nextel South Corp.; Nextel West Corp.; Samsung Telecommunications America LLC; Sprint Spectrum L.P.; TMobile USA, Inc.; TracFone Wireless, Inc.; Virgin Mobile USA, LP (collectively "the Alltel Defendants"). Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 3/1/2010. (ch, )
March 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 463 ORDER granting 459 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Its First Amended Answer, Affirmative Defenses, and Counterclaims to Plaintiff Minerva Industries, Inc.s Consolidated Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 3/1/10. (ehs, )
March 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 462 ORDER granting 457 Motion for Extension of Time to File Extend deadline relatinga to expert reports. The party with the burden of proof on an issue must serve its expert report(s) by March 19, 2010. It is further ORDERED that any rebuttal expert report(s) must be served by April 27, 2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 3/1/10. (ehs, )
March 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 461 ORDER granting 451 Motion for Leave to Join in Research in Motion Corporations Supplemental Invalidity Contentions (Motion). Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 3/1/10. (ehs, )
February 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 460 Sealed Document - Defendant Palm, Inc.'s First Amended Answer to Consolidated Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, and Counterclaims. (Smith, Melissa)
February 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 459 Unopposed SEALED MOTION to File First Amended Answer to Consolidated Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, and Counterclaims by Palm, Inc.,. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
February 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 458 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Thomas D. Fortenberry by Alltel Communications, LLC, Sprint Spectrum L.P., Nextel of Texas Inc, Nextel South Corp, Nextel of New York Inc, Nextel Communications of Mid-Atlantic Inc, Nextel of California Inc, Nextel West Corp, Cellco Partnership, MetroPCS Wireless, Inc., HELIO LLC, Kyocera Wireless Corp., T-Mobile USA, Inc., Tracfone Wireless, Inc., Virgin Mobile USA, LP, LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc., Samsung Telecommunications America LLC, AT&T Mobility, LLC, Dobson Cellular Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fortenberry, Thomas)
February 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 457 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File /for Leave to Extend the Deadlines Relating to Expert Reports by Minerva Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lee, Irene)
February 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 456 ORDER granting 450 Motion for Extension of Time to File Supplement Its Infringement Contentions To Include Devices Of Defendants Kyocera Wireless Corp., LG Electronics Mobilecomm USA, Inc. Samsung Telecommunications America LLC, And T-Mobile USA, Inc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 2/25/10. (ehs, )
February 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 455 ORDER granting 449 Motion for Leave to File Supplement Its Infringement Contentions To Include Defendant Palm, Inc.s Devices. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 2/25/10. (ehs, )
February 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 454 ORDER granting 448 Motion for Leave to File Supplement Its Infringement Contentions To Include Defendant Pantech Wireless, Inc.s (Pantech) Devices. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 2/25/10. (ehs, )
February 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 453 ORDER granting 447 Motion for Leave to File to Supplement its Invalidity Contentions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 2/25/10. (ehs, )
February 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 452 ORDER granting 445 Motion for Leave to File to Join in Research in Motion Corporations Supplemental Invalidity Contentions (Motion). Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 2/26/10. (ehs, )
February 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 451 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Leave to Join in Research in Motion Corporation's Supplemental Invalidity Contentions by LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc., Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Fred)
February 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 450 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File /Supplement Infringement Contentions to Include Kyocera Wireless Corp, LG Electronics MobileComm USA Inc, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC and T-Mobile USA Inc Devices by Minerva Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lee, Irene)
February 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 449 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File /Supplement Infringement Contentions to Include Palm Inc Devices by Minerva Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lee, Irene)
February 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 448 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File /Supplement Infringement Contentions to Include Pantech Wireless Devices by Minerva Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lee, Irene)
February 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 447 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File to Supplement Its Invalidity Contentions by Pantech Wireless, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
February 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 446 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric Joseph Klein on behalf of Alltel Communications, LLC, Sprint Spectrum L.P., Nextel of Texas Inc, Nextel South Corp, Nextel of New York Inc, Nextel Communications of Mid-Atlantic Inc, Nextel of California Inc, Nextel West Corp, Cellco Partnership, AT & T Mobility, LLC., MetroPCS Wireless, Inc., HELIO LLC, Kyocera Wireless Corp., T-Mobile USA, Inc., Tracfone Wireless, Inc., Virgin Mobile USA, LP, LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc., Samsung Telecommunications America LLC, Dobson Cellular Systems, Inc. (Klein, Eric)
February 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 445 ***REPLACES # 443 ***Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Alltel Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to Join in Research in Motion Corporation's Supplemental Invalidity Contentions by Alltel Communications, LLC, Sprint Spectrum L.P., Nextel of Texas Inc, Nextel South Corp, Nextel of New York Inc, Nextel Communications of Mid-Atlantic Inc, Nextel of California Inc, Nextel West Corp, Cellco Partnership, AT & T Mobility, LLC., MetroPCS Wireless, Inc., HELIO LLC, Kyocera Wireless Corp., T-Mobile USA, Inc., Tracfone Wireless, Inc., Virgin Mobile USA, LP, Dobson Cellular Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Fred) Modified on 2/25/2010 (ch, ).
February 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 444 ORDER granting 442 Motion for Leave to File Supplement its Invalidity Contentions. Palm is hereby granted leave to serve its supplemental invalidity contentions to add: (1) invalidity allegations relating to improper inventorship under 35 U.S.C. § 102(f); (2) Issue 2 of the Nokia 9110 Users Manual; (3) U.S. Patent No. 6,239,700 to Hoffman et al., U.S. Patent No. 6,122,521 to Wilkinson et al., and U.S. Patent No. 6, 035,216 to Cheng, et al.; and (4) U.S. Patent Not. 6,202, 060 to Tran.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 2/25/10. (ehs, )
February 25, 2010 Opinion or Order ***FILED IN ERROR. FILED UNDER WRONG EVENT - NEED TO REFILE UNDER MOTION Document # 443, Notice. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
February 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 443 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE.***NOTICE by Sprint Spectrum L.P., Nextel of Texas Inc, Nextel South Corp, Nextel of New York Inc, Nextel Communications of Mid-Atlantic Inc, Nextel of California Inc, Nextel West Corp, Cellco Partnership, MetroPCS Wireless, Inc., HELIO LLC, Kyocera Wireless Corp., T-Mobile USA, Inc., Tracfone Wireless, Inc., Virgin Mobile USA, LP, AT&T Mobility, LLC, Dobson Cellular Systems, Inc., Alltel Communication, Inc. Alltel Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to Join in Research in Motion Corporation's Supplemental Invalidity Contentions (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Fred) Modified on 2/25/2010 (ch, ).
February 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 442 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File to Supplement Invalidity Contentions by Palm, Inc.,. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
February 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 441 ORDER granting 438 Motion for Leave to File to supplement its invalidity contentions. Sony Ericsson be, and is hereby granted leave to serve its supplemental invalidity contentions to add: (1) invalidity allegations relating to improper inventorship under 35 U.S.C. § 102(f); (2) Issue 2 of the Nokia 9110 Users Manual; (3) U.S. Patent No. 6,239,700 to Hoffman et al., U.S. Patent No. 6,122,521 to Wilkinson et al., and U.S Patent No. 6,035,216 to Cheng, et al.; and (4) U.S. Patent No. 6,202,060 to Tran. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 2/24/10. (ehs, )
February 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 440 ORDER granting 437 Motion an Additional Expert. that RIM is granted relief from the expert limitation of paragraph 4(c) of the Amended Discovery Order, such that RIM may offer testimony from an additional expert with regard to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office procedure. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 2/24/10. (ehs, )
February 24, 2010 Opinion or Order ***FILED IN ERROR. ORDERS ARE NOT FILE SEPARATELY Document # 439, Additional Attachments. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
February 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 439 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE.***Additional Attachments to Main Document: 438 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Sony Ericsson's Unopposed Motion for Leave to Serve Supplemental Invalidity Contentions.. (Schulte, David) Modified on 2/24/2010 (ch, ).
February 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 438 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Sony Ericsson's Unopposed Motion for Leave to Serve Supplemental Invalidity Contentions by Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications (USA), Inc., Sony Ericsson Communications, (USA), Inc.. (Schulte, David)
February 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 437 Unopposed MOTION For an Additional Expert by Research In Motion Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chassman, Peter)
February 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 436 ORDER granting 434 Motion to Amend the Discovery Order. The Amended Discovery Order attached to the above referenced motion as Exhibit A is hereby entered in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 2/25/10. (ehs, )
February 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 435 NOTICE by Minerva Industries, Inc. of Compliance with Court's 2/3/10 Order (Lee, Irene)
February 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 434 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct the Discovery Order by Alltel Communications, LLC, Minerva Industries, Inc., Research In Motion Corporation, Alltel Communications Inc, A T & T Mobility LLC, Dobson Cellular Systems Inc, HELIO LLC, Hewlett-Packard Company, MetroPCS Wireless, Inc., Sprint Spectrum L.P., Nextel of Texas Inc, Nextel South Corp, Nextel of New York Inc, Nextel Communications of Mid-Atlantic Inc, Nextel of California Inc, Nextel West Corp, T-Mobile USA, Inc., Tracfone Wireless, Inc., Cellco Partnership, Virgin Mobile USA, LP, Kyocera Wireless Corp., LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc., Palm, Inc., AT & T Mobility, LLC., Pantech Wireless, Inc., Sanyo North America Corporation, Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications (USA), Inc., Samsung Telecommunications America LLC, Alltel Communications, Inc., Dobson Cellular Systems Inc., LG Electronics MobileComm USA, Inc., AT&T Mobility, LLC, Dobson Cellular Systems, Inc., Helio, LLC, Kyocera Wireless Corporation, LG Electronics Mobilecomm USA., Inc.,, Palm, Inc.,, Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC, Alltel Communication, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Amended Discovery Order, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Chassman, Peter) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/17/2010: # 3 REVISED ORDER) (ch, ).
February 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 433 ORDER granting 432 Motion to Dismiss. All claims and counterclaims asserted in this case between Plaintiff Minerva Industries, Inc. and Defendant HTC America, Inc. are hereby dismissed with prejudice. It is further ORDERED that all attorneys fees and costs are to be borne by the Party that incurred them. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 2/11/2010. (ch, )
February 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 432 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendant HTC America, Inc. with Prejudice by Minerva Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fenster, Marc)
February 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 431 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of MOTIONS HEARING held on 2/2/10 before Judge Chad Everingham. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR,Telephone number: (903) 663-5082. (61 pages)NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/5/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/15/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/13/2010. (tja, )
February 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 430 ORDER denying 347 Motion to Stay, (see order for further details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 2/9/2010. (ch, ) Modified on 2/9/2010 (ch, ).
February 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 429 ORDER granting 428 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Eric B Carlson terminated as counsel for Minerva Industries Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 2/9/2010. (ch, )
February 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 428 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Minerva Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Carlson, Eric)
February 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 427 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jane Politz Brandt on behalf of Sony Ericsson Communications, (USA), Inc. (Brandt, Jane)
February 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 426 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Bruce S Sostek on behalf of Sony Ericsson Communications, (USA), Inc. (Sostek, Bruce)
February 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 425 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew Paul Harper on behalf of Sony Ericsson Communications, (USA), Inc. (Harper, Matthew)
February 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 424 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 389 Motion for Summary Judgment of invalidity for indefiniteness. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 2/4/2010. (ch, )
February 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 422 MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER - The court adopts the constructions set forth in this opinion for the disputed terms of the 783 and 120 patents. The parties are ordered that they may not refer, directly or indirectly, to each others claim construction positions in the presence of the jury. Likewise, the parties are ordered to refrain from mentioning any portion of this opinion, other than the actual definitions adopted by the court, in the presence of the jury. Any reference to claim construction proceedings is limited to informing the jury of the definitions adopted by the court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 2/3/10. (ehs, )
February 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 421 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 394 Sealed Motion to compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 2/3/10. (ehs, )
February 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 423 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham: Motion Hearing held on 2/2/2010 re 355 Defendants' Summary Judgment Motion of Unenforceability Under the Doctrine of Inequitable Conduct Or, In The Alternative, For Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. 185 and 394 SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion to Compel Minerva Industries, Inc.'s Document Production and Discovery Responses. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR.)(jml)
January 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 420 NOTICE by Minerva Industries, Inc. re 419 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion, Sealed Surreply in Opposition to Defendants Motion to Compel [Doc394] (Lee, Irene)
January 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 419 SEALED SURREPLY in Opposition to Defendants' Motion To Compel re 394 SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion to Compel Minerva Industries, Inc.'s Document Production and Discovery Responses filed by Minerva Industries, Inc.. (Lee, Irene)
January 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 418 NOTICE of Hearing: Hearing on Defendants' Summary Judgment of Enforceability Under the Doctrine of Inequitable Conduct or, in the Alternative, for Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. § 185 (Dkt. #355) AND Defendants' Motion to Compel Minerva Industries, Inc.'s Document Production and Discovery Responses (Dkt. #394), set for 2/2/2010, 09:30 AM, in Mag Ctrm (Marshall) before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham.(delat)
January 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 417 REPLY to Response to Motion re 394 SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion to Compel Minerva Industries, Inc.'s Document Production and Discovery Responses filed by Alltel Communications, LLC, Sprint Spectrum L.P., Nextel of Texas Inc, Nextel South Corp, Nextel of New York Inc, Nextel Communications of Mid-Atlantic Inc, Nextel of California Inc, Nextel West Corp, Cellco Partnership, AT & T Mobility, LLC., MetroPCS Wireless, Inc., HELIO LLC, Kyocera Wireless Corp., T-Mobile USA, Inc., Tracfone Wireless, Inc., Virgin Mobile USA, LP, HTC America, Inc., LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc., Samsung Telecommunications America LLC, Dobson Cellular Systems, Inc.. (Williams, Fred)
January 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 416 NOTICE of Hearing: Hearing on Defendants' Summary Judgment Motion of Unenforceability Under the Doctrine of Inequitable Conduct or, in the Alternative, for Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. § 185 (Dkt. #355) set for 2/2/2010, 09:30 AM, in Mag Ctrm (Marshall) before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham. (delat)
January 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 415 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of CLAIM CONSTRUCTION HEARING held on 1/6/10 before Judge Chad Everingham. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR,Telephone number: (903) 663-5082. (91 pages)NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/8/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/18/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/19/2010. (tja, )
January 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 414 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ashley Lauren Rodgers on behalf of Sprint Spectrum L.P., Nextel of Texas Inc, Nextel South Corp, Nextel of New York Inc, Nextel Communications of Mid-Atlantic Inc, Nextel of California Inc, Nextel West Corp, Cellco Partnership, AT & T Mobility, LLC., MetroPCS Wireless, Inc., HELIO LLC, Kyocera Wireless Corp., T-Mobile USA, Inc., Tracfone Wireless, Inc., Alltel Communications, Inc., Virgin Mobile USA, LP, HTC America, Inc., LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc., Samsung Telecommunications America LLC, Dobson Cellular Systems, Inc. (Rodgers, Ashley)
January 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 413 ***REPLACES # 412 *** MOTION for Hearing re 355 SEALED MOTION Defendants' Summary Judgment Motion of Unenforceability Under the Doctrine of Inequitable Conduct Or, In The Alternative, For Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. 185 Defendants' Request for Oral Hearing by Alltel Communications, LLC, Sprint Spectrum L.P., Nextel of Texas Inc, Nextel South Corp, Nextel of New York Inc, Nextel Communications of Mid-Atlantic Inc, Nextel of California Inc, Nextel West Corp, Cellco Partnership, MetroPCS Wireless, Inc., HELIO LLC, Kyocera Wireless Corp., T-Mobile USA, Inc., Tracfone Wireless, Inc., Virgin Mobile USA, LP, HTC America, Inc., LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc., Samsung Telecommunications America LLC, AT&T Mobility, LLC, Dobson Cellular Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Fred) Modified on 1/13/2010 (ch, ).
January 12, 2010 Opinion or Order ***FILED IN ERROR. NO CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE, NEED REVISED ORDER Document # 412, Motion for Hearing. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
January 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 412 ***FILED IN ERROR. NO CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE. NEED REVISED ORDER. PLEASE IGNORE.*** MOTION for Hearing re 355 SEALED MOTION Defendants' Summary Judgment Motion of Unenforceability Under the Doctrine of Inequitable Conduct Or, In The Alternative, For Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. 185 Defendants' Request for Oral Hearing by Alltel Communications, LLC, Sprint Spectrum L.P., Nextel of Texas Inc, Nextel South Corp, Nextel of New York Inc, Nextel Communications of Mid-Atlantic Inc, Nextel of California Inc, Nextel West Corp, Cellco Partnership, AT & T Mobility, LLC., MetroPCS Wireless, Inc., HELIO LLC, Kyocera Wireless Corp., T-Mobile USA, Inc., Tracfone Wireless, Inc., Virgin Mobile USA, LP, HTC America, Inc., LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc., Samsung Telecommunications America LLC, Dobson Cellular Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Williams, Fred) Modified on 1/12/2010 (ch, ).
January 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 411 ***REPLACES # 408 ***SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 394 SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion to Compel Minerva Industries, Inc.'s Document Production and Discovery Responses filed by Minerva Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lee, Irene) Modified on 1/11/2010 (ch, ).
January 11, 2010 Opinion or Order ***FILED IN ERROR. NEED TO REFILE # 408 AND 409 Document # 409, Noitce. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, ) Modified on 1/11/2010 (ch, ). (ORDER HAS BEEN ATTACHED TO # 411)
January 11, 2010 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the 408 submitted by Minerva Industries, Inc.. NO CERTIFICATE OF AUTHORIZATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL. Correction should be made by one business day (ch, )
January 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 410 Minerva Industries, Inc.'s Answer to Sony Ericsson's Amended Counterclaims and ANSWER to Complaint 398 (filed under seal) by Minerva Industries, Inc..(Lee, Irene)
January 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 409 ***FILED IN ERROR. FILED UNDER WRONG EVENT. PLEASE IGNORE.*** NOTICE by Minerva Industries, Inc. re 408 Sealed Response to Motion, to Compel Minerva Industries, Inc.'s Document Production and Discovery Responses (Lee, Irene) Modified on 1/11/2010 (ch, ).
January 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 408 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT. NO CERTIFICATE OF AUTHORIZATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL. PLEASE IGNORE.***SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 394 SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion to Compel Minerva Industries, Inc.'s Document Production and Discovery Responses filed by Minerva Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lee, Irene) Modified on 1/11/2010 (ch, ).
January 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 407 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William Joseph Cornelius, Jr on behalf of Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications (USA), Inc. (Cornelius, William)
January 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 406 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham: Markman Hearing held on 1/6/2010. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR.) (Attachments: # 1 Sign-in Sheet) (jml)
January 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 405 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Larry R Schmadeka for LG Electronics MobileComm USA, Inc. and LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc..(APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-1-5112) (ehs, )
January 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 404 ORDER granting 403 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendants Motion to Compel Minerva Industries, Inc.s Document Production and Discovery Responses [No. 394]. Responses due by 1/8/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 1/5/10. (ehs, )
January 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 403 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 394 SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion to Compel Minerva Industries, Inc.'s Document Production and Discovery Responses by Minerva Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lee, Irene)
December 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 402 RESPONSE to Motion re 389 Joint MOTION for Summary Judgment (Defendants') of Invalidity for Indefiniteness Under 35 U.S.C. 112, 2Joint MOTION for Summary Judgment (Defendants') of Invalidity for Indefiniteness Under 35 U.S.C. 112, 2Joint MOTION for Summary Judgment (Defendants') of Invalidity for Indefiniteness Under 35 U.S.C. 112, 2Joint MOTION for Summary Judgment (Defendants') of Invalidity for Indefiniteness Under 35 U.S.C. 112, 2Joint MOTION for Summary Judgment (Defendants') of Invalidity for Indefiniteness Under 35 U.S.C. 112, 2Joint MOTION for Summary Judgment (Defendants') of Invalidity for Indefiniteness Under 35 U.S.C. 112, 2 and Response to Alltel Defendants' Surreply Brief on Claim Construction 379 filed by Minerva Industries, Inc.. (Fenster, Marc)
December 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 401 ORDER granting 395 Motion to Dismiss all claims and counterclaims asserted in this case between Plaintiff Minerva Industries, Inc. and Defendant Nokia Inc. are hereby dismissed with prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all attorneys fees and costs are to be born by the Party that incurred them. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 12/28/09. (ehs, )
December 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 400 ORDER granting 399 Motion for Leave to extemd Deadlines Relating to Expert. The party with the burden of proof on an issue must serve its expert report(s) 30 days after the Court issues its claim construction ruling. It is further ORDERED that any rebuttal expert report(s) must be served 60 days after the Court issues its claim construction ruling. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 12/2/09. (ehs, )
December 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 399 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Joint Motion for Leave to Extend the Deadlines Relating to Expert Reports by Alltel Communications, LLC, Minerva Industries, Inc., Research In Motion Corporation, Motorola Inc, Nokia Inc., Alltel Communications Inc, A T & T Mobility LLC, Dobson Cellular Systems Inc, HELIO LLC, Hewlett-Packard Company, MetroPCS Wireless, Inc., Sprint Spectrum L.P., Nextel of Texas Inc, Nextel South Corp, Nextel of New York Inc, Nextel Communications of Mid-Atlantic Inc, Nextel of California Inc, Nextel West Corp, T-Mobile USA, Inc., Tracfone Wireless, Inc., Cellco Partnership, Virgin Mobile USA, LP, HTC America, Inc., Kyocera Wireless Corp., LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc., Palm, Inc., AT & T Mobility, LLC., Pantech Wireless, Inc., Sanyo North America Corporation, Utstarcom, Inc.,, Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications (USA), Inc., Samsung Telecommunications America LLC, Motorola, Inc., Alltel Communications, Inc., Dobson Cellular Systems Inc., LG Electronics MobileComm USA, Inc., AT&T Mobility, LLC, Dobson Cellular Systems, Inc., Helio, LLC, T-Mobile USA, HTC America, Inc.,, LG Electronics Mobilecomm USA., Inc.,, Palm, Inc.,, Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC, Nokia, Inc., Alltel Communication, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chassman, Peter)
December 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 398 SEALED Defendant Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications (USA) Inc.'s Amended Answer and Counterclaims. Originally filed on 12/18/09 as Exhibit A to Motion for Leave to Amend; the Court granted leave to file on 12/22/09.(Schulte, David)
December 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 397 JOINT CLAIM CONSTRUCTION CHARTS PURSUANT TO P.R. 4-5(d) filed by Research In Motion Corporation, Alltel Communications Inc, A T & T Mobility LLC, Dobson Cellular Systems Inc, HELIO LLC, Hewlett-Packard Company, MetroPCS Wireless, Inc., Sprint Spectrum L.P., Nextel of Texas Inc, Nextel South Corp, Nextel of New York Inc, Nextel Communications of Mid-Atlantic Inc, Nextel of California Inc, Nextel West Corp, T-Mobile USA, Inc., Tracfone Wireless, Inc., Cellco Partnership, Virgin Mobile USA, LP, HTC America, Inc., Kyocera Wireless Corp., LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc., Palm, Inc., Pantech Wireless, Inc., Sanyo North America Corporation, Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications (USA), Inc., Samsung Telecommunications America LLC, Minerva Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Landis, Todd)
December 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 396 ORDER granting 393 Motion of Defendant Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications (USA) Inc. (Sony Ericsson) to seal and for leave to file an amended answer and counterclaims against Plaintiff Minerva Industries, Inc. (Minerva). Sony Ericsson permitted to file under seal the above referenced motion and amended answer and counterclaims. Sony Ericssons motion for leave to amend begranted leave to file its amended pleading, a copy of which was attached as Exhibit A to Sony Ericssons motion for leave to amend. That the effective filing and service dates of Sony Ericssons amended pleading are the date of the granting of this ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 12/22/09. (ehs, )
December 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 395 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Nokia Inc. with Prejudice by Minerva Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fenster, Marc)
December 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 394 SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion to Compel Minerva Industries, Inc.'s Document Production and Discovery Responses by Sprint Spectrum L.P., Nextel of Texas Inc, Nextel South Corp, Nextel of New York Inc, Nextel Communications of Mid-Atlantic Inc, Nextel of California Inc, Nextel West Corp, Cellco Partnership, AT & T Mobility, LLC., MetroPCS Wireless, Inc., HELIO LLC, Kyocera Wireless Corp., T-Mobile USA, Inc., Tracfone Wireless, Inc., Virgin Mobile USA, LP, HTC America, Inc., LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc., Samsung Telecommunications America LLC, Dobson Cellular Systems, Inc., Alltel Communication, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Text of Proposed Order Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Fred)
December 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 393 Unopposed SEALED MOTION to Seal and for Leave to File Amended Answer and Counterclaims by Sony Ericsson Communications, (USA), Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A -- Sony Ericsson's Amended Answer and Counterclaims, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Schulte, David)
December 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 392 ORDER granting 391 Motion for Leave to File Supplement Its Invalidity Contentions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 12/18/09. (ehs, )
December 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 391 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Leave to Supplement Its Invalidity Contentions by Research In Motion Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chassman, Peter)
December 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 390 NOTICE by Alltel Communications, LLC, Research In Motion Corporation, Nokia Inc., Alltel Communications Inc, A T & T Mobility LLC, Dobson Cellular Systems Inc, HELIO LLC, Hewlett-Packard Company, MetroPCS Wireless, Inc., Sprint Spectrum L.P., Nextel of Texas Inc, Nextel South Corp, Nextel of New York Inc, Nextel Communications of Mid-Atlantic Inc, Nextel of California Inc, Nextel West Corp, T-Mobile USA, Inc., Tracfone Wireless, Inc., Cellco Partnership, Virgin Mobile USA, LP, HTC America, Inc., Kyocera Wireless Corp., LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc., Palm, Inc., AT & T Mobility, LLC., Pantech Wireless, Inc., Sanyo North America Corporation, Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications (USA), Inc., Samsung Telecommunications America LLC, Alltel Communications, Inc., Dobson Cellular Systems Inc., LG Electronics MobileComm USA, Inc., AT&T Mobility, LLC, Dobson Cellular Systems, Inc., Helio, LLC, T-Mobile USA, HTC America, Inc.,, Kyocera Wireless Corporation, LG Electronics Mobilecomm USA., Inc.,, Palm, Inc.,, Nokia, Inc., Alltel Communication, Inc. re 389 Joint MOTION for Summary Judgment (Defendants') of Invalidity for Indefiniteness Under 35 U.S.C. 112, 2Joint MOTION for Summary Judgment (Defendants') of Invalidity for Indefiniteness Under 35 U.S.C. 112, 2Joint MOTION for Summary Judgment (Defendants') of Invalidity for Indefiniteness Under 35 U.S.C. 112, 2Joint MOTION for Summary Judgment (Defendants') of Invalidity for Indefiniteness Under 35 U.S.C. 112, 2Joint MOTION for Summary Judgment (Defendants') of Invalidity for Indefiniteness Under 35 U.S.C. 112, 2Joint MOTION for Summary Judgment (Defendants') of Invalidity for Indefiniteness Under 35 U.S.C. 112, 2, 379 Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to Motion,, 356 Claim Construction Brief,,,, Defendants' Notice of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Chassman, Peter)
December 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 389 Joint MOTION for Summary Judgment (Defendants') of Invalidity for Indefiniteness Under 35 U.S.C. 112, 2 by Alltel Communications, LLC, Research In Motion Corporation, Nokia Inc., Alltel Communications Inc, A T & T Mobility LLC, Dobson Cellular Systems Inc, HELIO LLC, Hewlett-Packard Company, MetroPCS Wireless, Inc., Sprint Spectrum L.P., Nextel of Texas Inc, Nextel South Corp, Nextel of New York Inc, Nextel Communications of Mid-Atlantic Inc, Nextel of California Inc, Nextel West Corp, T-Mobile USA, Inc., Tracfone Wireless, Inc., Cellco Partnership, Virgin Mobile USA, LP, HTC America, Inc., Kyocera Wireless Corp., LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc., Palm, Inc., AT & T Mobility, LLC., Pantech Wireless, Inc., Sanyo North America Corporation, Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications (USA), Inc., Samsung Telecommunications America LLC, Alltel Communications, Inc., Dobson Cellular Systems Inc., LG Electronics MobileComm USA, Inc., AT&T Mobility, LLC, Dobson Cellular Systems, Inc., Helio, LLC, T-Mobile USA, HTC America, Inc.,, Kyocera Wireless Corporation, LG Electronics Mobilecomm USA., Inc.,, Palm, Inc.,, Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC, Nokia, Inc., Alltel Communication, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chassman, Peter)
December 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 388 ***FILED IN ERROR. ATTY NEED TO BE ADMITTED. PLEASE IGNORE.***NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Adam S Hoffman on behalf of Minerva Industries, Inc. (Hoffman, Adam) Modified on 12/16/2009 (ch, ).
December 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 387 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alexander Chester Giza on behalf of Minerva Industries, Inc. (Giza, Alexander)
December 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 386 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jessica Lea Hannah on behalf of Minerva Industries, Inc. (Hannah, Jessica)
December 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 385 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stanley H Thompson, Jr on behalf of Minerva Industries, Inc. (Thompson, Stanley)
December 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 384 ORDER - the court hereby supplements the Docket Control Order 226 with the deadlines herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 12/10/09. (ch, )
December 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 383 NOTICE by Research In Motion Corporation, Hewlett-Packard Company, Palm, Inc., Pantech Wireless, Inc., Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications (USA), Inc., Palm, Inc., re 379 Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to Motion,, Palm Defendants' Notice of Intent to Join, In Part, The Alltel Defendants' Sur-Reply Brief on Claim Construction (Chassman, Peter)
November 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 382 ORDER granting 378 Motion for Leave to File Surreply Brief on Claim Construction. Alltel Defendants are given leave to file a surreply to Plaintiff Minerva Industries, Inc.s Reply Brief Regarding Claim Construction (D.E. 365). Plaintiff is given leave to file a surreply in response to theAlltel Defendants surreply. The page-length of Plaintiffs surreply shall not exceed the pagelength of the Alltel Defendants surreply. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 11/25/09. (ehs, )
November 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 381 ORDER granting 377 Motion for Leave to File supplement its Infringement Contentions under Patent Rule 3-1 of this Court to include the following Sony Ericsson models: C702, C902, C905a, W595a, TM506, W595, W760a, X1 Xperia, C510a, W995s, C510, W705, W995, W518a, W995a, W350a, and W705a. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 11/24/09. (ehs, )
November 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 380 ORDER granting 376 Motion for Leave to File To Supplement Its Infringement Contentions To Include Defendant Research In Motion Corporations (RIM) Accused Devices. Minerva has leave to supplement its Infringement Contentions under Patent Rule 3-1 of this Court to add infringement contentions against RIMs Blackberry Model Nos. 8220, 8230, 8350i, 8520, 8530, 8900, 9000, 9530, 9630, and 9700 in accordance with the separate agreement negotiated between the parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 11/24/09. (ehs, )
November 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 379 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 378 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Surreply Brief on Claim Construction Alltel Defendants' Surreply Brief on Claim Construction filed by Nokia Inc., Alltel Communications Inc, A T & T Mobility LLC, Dobson Cellular Systems Inc, HELIO LLC, MetroPCS Wireless, Inc., Sprint Spectrum L.P., Nextel of Texas Inc, Nextel South Corp, Nextel of New York Inc, Nextel Communications of Mid-Atlantic Inc, Nextel of California Inc, Nextel West Corp, T-Mobile USA, Inc., Tracfone Wireless, Inc., Cellco Partnership, Virgin Mobile USA, LP, HTC America, Inc., Kyocera Wireless Corp., LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc., Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. (Landis, Todd)
November 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 378 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Surreply Brief on Claim Construction by Nokia Inc., Alltel Communications Inc, A T & T Mobility LLC, Dobson Cellular Systems Inc, MetroPCS Wireless, Inc., Sprint Spectrum L.P., Nextel of Texas Inc, Nextel South Corp, Nextel of New York Inc, Nextel Communications of Mid-Atlantic Inc, Nextel of California Inc, Nextel West Corp, T-Mobile USA, Inc., Tracfone Wireless, Inc., Cellco Partnership, Virgin Mobile USA, LP, HTC America, Inc., Kyocera Wireless Corp., LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc., Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Landis, Todd)
November 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 377 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File SUPPLEMENTAL INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS TO INCLUDE DEFENDANT SONY ERICSSON COMMUNICATIONS (USA) INC.'S DEVICES by Minerva Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lee, Irene)
November 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 376 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File SUPPLEMENTAL INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS TO INCLUDE DEFENDANT RESEARCH IN MOTION CORPORATION'S ACCUSED DEVICES by Minerva Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lee, Irene)
November 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 375 Minerva's Reply to Research In Motion's First Amended ANSWER to Complaint and Counterclaims Doc 373 by Minerva Industries, Inc..(Fenster, Marc)
November 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 374 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 355 SEALED MOTION Defendants' Summary Judgment Motion of Unenforceability Under the Doctrine of Inequitable Conduct Or, In The Alternative, For Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. 185 filed by Minerva Industries, Inc.. (Fenster, Marc)
October 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 373 SEALED Defendant Research in Motion Corporation's First Amended Answer, Affirmative Defenses, and Counterclaims. Originally filed as Exhibit to Motion for Leave to File Answer. Court granted leave to file on 10/30/09. The time for filing a response shall run from 10/30/09.(jml )
October 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 372 ORDER granting 370 Sealed Motion for leave to file its First Amended Answers, Affirmative Defenses, and Counterclaims, a copy of which was filed contemporaneously with Defendants Motion as Exhibit A. The effective filing date of Defendant Research In Motion Corporations First Amended Answers, Affirmative Defenses, and Counterclaims, and the effective service date to Plaintiff, is the date of the granting of this ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 10/30/09. (ehs, )
October 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 371 ORDER granting 367 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages may exceed the page limit by two (2) pages.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 10/30/09. (ehs, )
October 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 370 Unopposed SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Its First Amended Answer, Affirmative Defenses, and Counterclaims to Plaintiff's Consolidated Complaint by Research In Motion Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Chassman, Peter)
October 27, 2009 Opinion or Order NOTICE FROM CLERK re 368 Reply to Response to Motion. This event was modified, per atty's request, to modify Attachment 2 and 3 (Exhibit 1 and 2 to declaration) substituting only a cover sheet for these exhibits. Atty has refiled (see #369) this pleading with corrected exhibit 2 and 3 (redacted transcripts). NOTE: This entry was terminated but atty requested these exhibits not be available as filed. (sm, )
October 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 369 REPLY to Response to Motion re 355 SEALED MOTION Defendants' Summary Judgment Motion of Unenforceability Under the Doctrine of Inequitable Conduct Or, In The Alternative, For Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. 185 Defendants' Reply In Support of Their Summary Judgment Motion of Unenforceability Under the Doctrine of Inequitable Conduct Or, In The Alternative, For Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. Section 185 filed by Research In Motion Corporation, Nokia Inc., Alltel Communications Inc, A T & T Mobility LLC, Dobson Cellular Systems Inc, HELIO LLC, Hewlett-Packard Company, MetroPCS Wireless, Inc., Sprint Spectrum L.P., Nextel of Texas Inc, Nextel South Corp, Nextel of New York Inc, Nextel Communications of Mid-Atlantic Inc, Nextel of California Inc, Nextel West Corp, T-Mobile USA, Inc., Tracfone Wireless, Inc., Cellco Partnership, Virgin Mobile USA, LP, HTC America, Inc., Kyocera Wireless Corp., LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc., Palm, Inc., Pantech Wireless, Inc., Sanyo North America Corporation, Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications (USA), Inc., Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Thomas William Kennedy Jr. In Support of Defendants' Reply In Support of Their Summary Judgment Motion of Unenforceability Under the Doctrine of Inequitable Conduct Or, In The Alternative, For Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. Section 185, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Thomas William Kennedy Jr. In Support of Defendants' Reply In Support of Their Summary Judgment Motion of Unenforceability Under the Doctrine of Inequitable Conduct Or, In The Alternative, For Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. Section 185, # 3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Thomas William Kennedy Jr. In Support of Defendants' Reply In Support of Their Summary Judgment Motion of Unenforceability Under the Doctrine of Inequitable Conduct Or, In The Alternative, For Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. Section 185, # 4 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Thomas William Kennedy Jr. In Support of Defendants' Reply In Support of Their Summary Judgment Motion of Unenforceability Under the Doctrine of Inequitable Conduct Or, In The Alternative, For Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. Section 185)(Landis, Todd)
October 27, 2009 Opinion or Order ***FILED IN ERROR, PER ATTY, ATTY IS REFILING. Document # 368, Reply. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (sm, )
October 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 368 ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE.***REPLY to Response to Motion re 355 SEALED MOTION Defendants' Summary Judgment Motion of Unenforceability Under the Doctrine of Inequitable Conduct Or, In The Alternative, For Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. 185 Defendants' Reply In Support of Their Summary Judgment Motion of Unenforceability Under the Doctrine of Inequitable Conduct Or, In the Alternative, For Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. Section 185 filed by Research In Motion Corporation, Nokia Inc., Alltel Communications Inc, A T & T Mobility LLC, Dobson Cellular Systems Inc, HELIO LLC, Hewlett-Packard Company, MetroPCS Wireless, Inc., Sprint Spectrum L.P., Nextel of Texas Inc, Nextel South Corp, Nextel of New York Inc, Nextel Communications of Mid-Atlantic Inc, Nextel of California Inc, Nextel West Corp, T-Mobile USA, Inc., Tracfone Wireless, Inc., Cellco Partnership, Virgin Mobile USA, LP, HTC America, Inc., Kyocera Wireless Corp., LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc., Palm, Inc., Pantech Wireless, Inc., Sanyo North America Corporation, Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications (USA), Inc., Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Thomas William Kennedy Jr. In Support of Defendants' Reply in Support of Their Summary Judgment Motion of Unenforceability Under the Doctrine of Inequitable Conduct Or, In The Alternative, For Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. Section 185, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of T. Kennedy In Support of Defendants' Reply In Support of Their Summary Judgment Motion of Unenforceability Under The Doctrine of Inequitable Conduct Or, In The Alternative, For Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. Section 185, # 3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of T. Kennedy In Support of Defendants' Reply In Support of Their Summary Judgment Motion of Unenforceability Under The Doctrine of Inequitable Conduct Or, In The Alternative, For Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. Section 185, # 4 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of T. Kennedy In Support of Defendants' Reply In Support of Their Summary Judgment Motion of Unenforceability Under The Doctrine of Inequitable Conduct Or, In The Alternative, For Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. Section 185)(Landis, Todd) Modified on 10/27/2009 (sm, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/27/2009: # 5 EXHIBIT 1) (sm, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/27/2009: # 6 EXHIBIT 2/Attachment 3) (sm, ).
October 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 367 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Defendants' Reply in Support of Their Summary Judgment Motion of Unenforceability Under the Doctrine of Inequitable Conduct or, in the Alternative, for Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. Section 185 by Research In Motion Corporation, Alltel Communications Inc, Sprint Spectrum L.P., Nextel of Texas Inc, Nextel South Corp, Nextel of New York Inc, Nextel Communications of Mid-Atlantic Inc, Nextel of California Inc, Nextel West Corp, Cellco Partnership, Palm, Inc., AT & T Mobility, LLC., Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications (USA), Inc., Dobson Cellular Systems Inc, Hewlett-Packard Company, MetroPCS Wireless, Inc., HELIO LLC, Kyocera Wireless Corp., LG Electronics MobileComm USA, Inc., Nokia Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc., Tracfone Wireless, Inc., HTC America, Inc.,, Pantech Wireless, Inc., Sanyo North America Corporation, Virgin Mobile USA, LP, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Landis, Todd)
October 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 366 ORDER granting 364 Motion to Unseal Document 361 Sealed Patent Response to Sealed Patent Motion, 355 SEALED MOTION Defendants' Summary Judgment Motion of Unenforceability Under the Doctrine of Inequitable Conduct Or, In The Alternative, For Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. 185. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 10/23/09. (ehs, )
October 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 365 REPLY to Defendants' Responsive Brief on Claim Construction 356 filed by Minerva Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 10)(Fenster, Marc)
October 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 364 Joint MOTION to Unseal Document 361 Sealed Patent Response to Sealed Patent Motion,,,, filed by Minerva Industries, Inc., 355 SEALED MOTION Defendants' Summary Judgment Motion of Unenforceability Under the Doctrine of Inequitable Conduct Or, In The Alternative, For Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. 185 filed by Pantech Wireless, Inc., Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications (USA), Inc., Cellco Partnership, LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc., Sanyo North America Corporation, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC, Nextel Communications of Mid-Atlantic Inc, Dobson Cellular Systems Inc, Virgin Mobile USA, LP, Nextel West Corp, Nextel South Corp, Hewlett-Packard Company, Nokia Inc., HELIO LLC, Alltel Communications Inc, Tracfone Wireless, Inc., A T & T Mobility LLC, Nextel of Texas Inc, MetroPCS Wireless, Inc., Palm, Inc., Nextel of New York Inc, Kyocera Wireless Corp., Research In Motion Corporation, HTC America, Inc., Nextel of California Inc, T-Mobile USA, Inc., Sprint Spectrum L.P. by Research In Motion Corporation, Alltel Communications Inc, A T & T Mobility LLC, Sprint Spectrum L.P., Nextel of Texas Inc, Nextel South Corp, Nextel of New York Inc, Nextel Communications of Mid-Atlantic Inc, Nextel of California Inc, Nextel West Corp, Cellco Partnership, Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications (USA), Inc., Dobson Cellular Systems Inc, Helio, LLC, Hewlett-Packard Company, MetroPCS Wireless, Inc., Kyocera Wireless Corp., Nokia Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc., Tracfone Wireless, Inc., Minerva Industries, Inc., Palm, Inc.,, Pantech Wireless, Inc., Sanyo North America Corporation, Virgin Mobile USA, LP, HTC America, Inc., LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc., Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Fred)
October 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 363 NOTICE by Minerva Industries, Inc. re 361 Sealed Patent Response to Sealed Patent Motion,,,, Amended Certificate of Service re Plaintiff's Responses to Defendants' Statement of Material Facts (Fenster, Marc)
October 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 362 NOTICE by Minerva Industries, Inc. re 361 Sealed Patent Response to Sealed Patent Motion,,,, of Filing Documents Under Seal (Fenster, Marc)
October 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 361 ***UNSEALED PER ORDER # 366 ***SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 355 SEALED MOTION Defendants' Summary Judgment Motion of Unenforceability Under the Doctrine of Inequitable Conduct Or, In The Alternative, For Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. 185 filed by Minerva Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A - Plaintiff's Responses to Defendants' Statement of Material Facts, # 2 Affidavit of Irving Keschner, # 3 Affidavit of Ki Il Kim, # 4 Exhibit 1 to Kim Dec, # 5 Exhibit 2 to Kim Dec, # 6 Exhibit 3 to Kim Dec, # 7 Exhibit 4 to Kim Dec, # 8 Exhibit 5 to Kim Dec, # 9 Exhibit 6 to Kim Dec, # 10 Exhibit 7 to Kim Dec, # 11 Affidavit of Irene Y. Lee, # 12 Exhibit A to Lee Dec, # 13 Exhibit B to Lee Dec, # 14 Exhibit C - Part 1 to Lee Dec, # 15 Exhibit C - Part 2 to Lee Dec, # 16 Exhibit C - Part 3 to Lee Dec, # 17 Exhibit D to Lee Dec, # 18 Exhibit E to Lee Dec, # 19 Affidavit of Conrad R. Solum, Jr., # 20 Text of Proposed Order)(Fenster, Marc) Modified on 10/27/2009 (ehs, ).
October 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 360 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 347 MOTION to Stay Pending Reexaminations filed by Minerva Industries, Inc.. (Fenster, Marc)
October 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 359 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by T-Mobile USA, Inc. (Williams, Fred)
October 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 358 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael E Jones on behalf of LG Electronics MobileComm USA, Inc. (Jones, Michael)
October 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 357 REPLY to Response to Motion re 347 MOTION to Stay Pending Reexaminations Defendants' Reply to Plaintiff Minerva Industries, Inc.'s Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Stay Pending Reexaminations filed by Nokia Inc., Alltel Communications Inc, A T & T Mobility LLC, Dobson Cellular Systems Inc, HELIO LLC, MetroPCS Wireless, Inc., Sprint Spectrum L.P., Nextel of Texas Inc, Nextel South Corp, Nextel of New York Inc, Nextel Communications of Mid-Atlantic Inc, Nextel of California Inc, Nextel West Corp, T-Mobile USA, Inc., Tracfone Wireless, Inc., Cellco Partnership, Virgin Mobile USA, LP, HTC America, Inc., Kyocera Wireless Corp., LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc., Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications (USA), Inc., Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Defendants' Reply to Plaintiff Minerva Industries, Inc.'s Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Stay Pending Reexaminations)(Williams, Fred)
October 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 356 Defendants' Responsive Brief on Claim Construction CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Research In Motion Corporation, Nokia Inc., Alltel Communications Inc, A T & T Mobility LLC, Dobson Cellular Systems Inc, HELIO LLC, Hewlett-Packard Company, MetroPCS Wireless, Inc., Sprint Spectrum L.P., Nextel of Texas Inc, Nextel South Corp, Nextel of New York Inc, Nextel Communications of Mid-Atlantic Inc, Nextel of California Inc, Nextel West Corp, T-Mobile USA, Inc., Tracfone Wireless, Inc., Cellco Partnership, Virgin Mobile USA, LP, HTC America, Inc., Kyocera Wireless Corp., LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc., Palm, Inc., Pantech Wireless, Inc., Sanyo North America Corporation, Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications (USA), Inc., Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Defendants' Responsive Brief on Claim Construction, # 2 Exhibit B to Defendants' Responsive Brief on Claim Construction, # 3 Exhibit C to Defendants' Responsive Brief on Claim Construction, # 4 Exhibit D to Defendants' Responsive Brief on Claim Construction)(Landis, Todd)
September 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 355 ***UNSEALED PER ORDER # 366 SEALED MOTION Defendants' Summary Judgment Motion of Unenforceability Under the Doctrine of Inequitable Conduct Or, In The Alternative, For Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. 185 by Research In Motion Corporation, Nokia Inc., Alltel Communications Inc, A T & T Mobility LLC, Dobson Cellular Systems Inc, HELIO LLC, Hewlett-Packard Company, MetroPCS Wireless, Inc., Sprint Spectrum L.P., Nextel of Texas Inc, Nextel South Corp, Nextel of New York Inc, Nextel Communications of Mid-Atlantic Inc, Nextel of California Inc, Nextel West Corp, T-Mobile USA, Inc., Tracfone Wireless, Inc., Cellco Partnership, Virgin Mobile USA, LP, HTC America, Inc., Kyocera Wireless Corp., LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc., Palm, Inc., Pantech Wireless, Inc., Sanyo North America Corporation, Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications (USA), Inc., Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Defendants' Summary Judgment Motion of Unenforceability Under the Doctrine of Inequitable Conduct Or, In The Alternative, For Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. 185, # 2 Exhibit B to Defendants' Summary Judgment Motion of Unenforceability Under the Doctrine of Inequitable Conduct Or, In The Alternative, For Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. 185, # 3 Exhibit C to Defendants' Summary Judgment Motion of Unenforceability Under the Doctrine of Inequitable Conduct Or, In The Alternative, For Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. 185, # 4 Exhibit D to Defendants' Summary Judgment Motion of Unenforceability Under the Doctrine of Inequitable Conduct Or, In The Alternative, For Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. 185, # 5 Exhibit E to Defendants' Summary Judgment Motion of Unenforceability Under the Doctrine of Inequitable Conduct Or, In The Alternative, For Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. 185, # 6 Exhibit F to Defendants' Summary Judgment Motion of Unenforceability Under the Doctrine of Inequitable Conduct Or, In The Alternative, For Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. 185, # 7 Exhibit G to Defendants' Summary Judgment Motion of Unenforceability Under the Doctrine of Inequitable Conduct Or, In The Alternative, For Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. 185, # 8 Exhibit H to Defendants' Summary Judgment Motion of Unenforceability Under the Doctrine of Inequitable Conduct Or, In The Alternative, For Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. 185, # 9 Exhibit I to Defendants' Summary Judgment Motion of Unenforceability Under the Doctrine of Inequitable Conduct Or, In The Alternative, For Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. 185, # 10 Exhibit J to Defendants' Summary Judgment Motion of Unenforceability Under the Doctrine of Inequitable Conduct Or, In The Alternative, For Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. 185, # 11 Exhibit K to Defendants' Summary Judgment Motion of Unenforceability Under the Doctrine of Inequitable Conduct Or, In The Alternative, For Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. 185, # 12 Exhibit L to Defendants' Summary Judgment Motion of Unenforceability Under the Doctrine of Inequitable Conduct Or, In The Alternative, For Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. 185, # 13 Errata M to Defendants' Summary Judgment Motion of Unenforceability Under the Doctrine of Inequitable Conduct Or, In The Alternative, For Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. 185, # 14 Exhibit N to Defendants' Summary Judgment Motion of Unenforceability Under the Doctrine of Inequitable Conduct Or, In The Alternative, For Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. 185, # 15 Exhibit O to Defendants' Summary Judgment Motion of Unenforceability Under the Doctrine of Inequitable Conduct Or, In The Alternative, For Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. 185, # 16 Exhibit P to Defendants' Summary Judgment Motion of Unenforceability Under the Doctrine of Inequitable Conduct Or, In The Alternative, For Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. 185, # 17 Exhibit Q to Defendants' Summary Judgment Motion of Unenforceability Under the Doctrine of Inequitable Conduct Or, In The Alternative, For Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. 185, # 18 Exhibit R to Defendants' Summary Judgment Motion of Unenforceability Under the Doctrine of Inequitable Conduct Or, In The Alternative, For Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. 185, # 19 Text of Proposed Order)(Landis, Todd) Modified on 10/27/2009 (ehs, ).
September 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 354 ORDER granting 352 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Deadline for Dfts to file their responsive claim construction brief pursuant to P.R. 4-5(b) is extended to 10/1/09. Deadline for plaintiffs to file its reply claim construction brief pursuant to P.R. 4-5(c) is extended to 10/22/09. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 9/24/09. (ch, )
September 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 353 RESPONSE in Opposition re 347 MOTION to Stay Pending Reexaminations filed by Minerva Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Fenster, Marc)
September 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 352 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Joint Motion for Leave to Extend the Deadlines Relating to the Remaining Claim Construction Briefs by Alltel Communications, LLC, Minerva Industries, Inc., Research In Motion Corporation, Nokia Inc., Alltel Communications Inc, A T & T Mobility LLC, Dobson Cellular Systems Inc, HELIO LLC, Hewlett-Packard Company, MetroPCS Wireless, Inc., Sprint Spectrum L.P., Nextel of Texas Inc, Nextel South Corp, Nextel of New York Inc, Nextel Communications of Mid-Atlantic Inc, Nextel of California Inc, Nextel West Corp, T-Mobile USA, Inc., Tracfone Wireless, Inc., Cellco Partnership, Virgin Mobile USA, LP, HTC America, Inc., Kyocera Wireless Corp., LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc., Palm, Inc., AT & T Mobility, LLC., Pantech Wireless, Inc., Sanyo North America Corporation, Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications (USA), Inc., Samsung Telecommunications America LLC, Alltel Communications, Inc., Dobson Cellular Systems Inc., LG Electronics MobileComm USA, Inc., AT&T Mobility, LLC, Dobson Cellular Systems, Inc., Helio, LLC, HTC America, Inc.,, Kyocera Wireless Corporation, LG Electronics Mobilecomm USA., Inc.,, Palm, Inc.,, Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC, Nokia, Inc., Alltel Communication, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chassman, Peter)
September 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 351 ORDER granting 350 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendants Motion to Stay Pending Reexaminations. Responses due by 9/23/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 9/17/09. (ehs, )
September 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 350 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 347 MOTION to Stay Pending Reexaminations by Minerva Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lee, Irene)
September 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 349 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Marti A Johnson for Virgin Mobil USA, LLC. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-1-4906) (ehs, )
September 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 348 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Daniel A DeVito for Virgin Mobil USA, LLC. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-1-4906) (ehs, )
September 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 347 MOTION to Stay Pending Reexaminations by Nokia Inc., Alltel Communications Inc, A T & T Mobility LLC, Dobson Cellular Systems Inc, HELIO LLC, MetroPCS Wireless, Inc., Sprint Spectrum L.P., Nextel South Corp, Nextel of New York Inc, Nextel Communications of Mid-Atlantic Inc, Nextel of California Inc, Nextel West Corp, T-Mobile USA, Inc., Tracfone Wireless, Inc., Virgin Mobile USA, LP, HTC America, Inc., Kyocera Wireless Corp., LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc., Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications (USA), Inc., Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Motion for Stay Pending Reexaminations, # 2 Exhibit B to Motion for Stay Pending Reexaminations, # 3 Exhibit C to Motion for Stay Pending Reexaminations, # 4 Exhibit D to Motion for Stay Pending Reexaminations, # 5 Exhibit E to Motion for Stay Pending Reexaminations, # 6 Exhibit F to Motion for Stay Pending Reexaminations, # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Fred)
August 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 346 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Benjamin M Stern for T-Mobile USA, Inc., T-Mobile USA and T-Mobile USA, Inc.. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-1-4884) (ehs, )
August 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 345 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas William Kennedy, Jr on behalf of Nokia Inc., Alltel Communications Inc, A T & T Mobility LLC, Dobson Cellular Systems Inc, HELIO LLC, MetroPCS Wireless, Inc., Sprint Spectrum L.P., Nextel of Texas Inc, Nextel South Corp, Nextel of New York Inc, Nextel Communications of Mid-Atlantic Inc, Nextel of California Inc, Nextel West Corp, T-Mobile USA, Inc., Tracfone Wireless, Inc., Cellco Partnership, Virgin Mobile USA, LP, HTC America, Inc., Kyocera Wireless Corp., LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc., Samsung Telecommunications America LLC (Kennedy, Thomas)
August 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 344 ORDER granting 343 Motion to Dismiss. All claims and counterclaims asserted in this suit between Plaintiff Minerva Industries, Inc. and Defendant UTStarcom, Inc. are hereby dismissed with prejudice and all counterclaims are dismissed as moot. It is further ORDERED that all attorneys fees and costs are to be borne by the Party that incurred them. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 8/20/09. (ch, )
August 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 343 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendant UTStarcom, Inc. by Minerva Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fenster, Marc)
August 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 342 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas D. Fortenberry on behalf of Alltel Communications, LLC, Sprint Spectrum L.P., Nextel of Texas Inc, Nextel South Corp, Nextel of New York Inc, Nextel Communications of Mid-Atlantic Inc, Nextel of California Inc, Nextel West Corp, Cellco Partnership, Dobson Cellular Systems Inc, MetroPCS Wireless, Inc., HELIO LLC, Kyocera Wireless Corp., LG Electronics MobileComm USA, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Nokia Inc., Tracfone Wireless, Inc., Virgin Mobile USA, LP, HTC America, Inc., Samsung Telecommunications America LLC, AT&T Mobility, LLC (Fortenberry, Thomas)
August 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 341 ORDER granting 335 Motion to Dismiss Motorola, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on August 7, 2009.(jml)
August 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 340 ORDER re 231 MOTION to Limit the Number of Asserted Patent Claims filed by Pantech Wireless, Inc., Alltel Communications, Inc., Sony Ericsson Communications, (USA), Inc., Sanyo North America Corporation, Dobson Cellular Systems, Inc., Samsung Telecommunications America LLC, LG Electronics MobileComm USA, Inc., Utstarcom, Inc.,, Virgin Mobil USA, LLC, Hewlett-Packard Company, Nokia Inc., Tracfone Wireless, Inc., Motorola, Inc., Kyocera Wireless Corp., HTC America, Inc., AT&T Mobility, LLC, Palm, Inc.,, T-Mobile USA, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on August 7, 2009. (jml)
August 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 339 ORDER granting 337 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on August 7, 2009. (jml)
August 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 338 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Minerva Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9)(Fenster, Marc)
August 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 337 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Minerva Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fenster, Marc)
August 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 336 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Edwin Jones on behalf of HTC America, Inc., Samsung Telecommunications America LLC (Jones, Michael)
August 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 335 Joint MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice as to Defendant Motorola, Inc. by Minerva Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fenster, Marc)
July 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 334 ORDER granting 231 Motion to limit the number of asserted patent. The court will conduct a claim construction hearing in this case on January 6, 2010, and the deadline for discovery concerning claims construction issues was July 1, 2009. Motion granted as set forth herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/30/09. (ehs, )
July 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 333 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/28/09. (ehs, )
July 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 332 ORDER granting 331 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Nancy Claire Abernathy terminated as counsel for Minerva Industries. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/28/09. (ehs, )
July 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 331 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney N. Claire Abernathy by Minerva Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
July 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 330 NOTICE by Minerva Industries, Inc. of Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Fenster, Marc)
June 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 329 ORDER granting 327 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The deadline for all parties to exchange preliminary claim constructions and extrinsic evidence pursuant to P.R. 4-3 is extended until July 1, 2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/30/09. (ehs, )
June 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 328 ORDER granting 326 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Deadline for all parties to exchange preliminary claim constructions and extrinsic evidence pursuant to P.R. 4-3 is extend until June 29, 2009.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/30/09. (ehs, )
June 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 327 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File and Complete a Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement Under Patent Rule 4-3 to July 1, 2009 by Minerva Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fenster, Marc)
June 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 326 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement Under P.R. 4-3 to June 29, 2009 by Minerva Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fenster, Marc)
June 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 325 ORDER granting 324 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement pursuant to P.R. 4-3 is extended until June 26, 2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/19/09. (ehs, )
June 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 324 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadline to Complete and File a Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement Under P.R. 4-3 to June 26, 2009 by Alltel Communications, LLC, Sprint Spectrum L.P., Nextel of Texas Inc, Nextel South Corp, Nextel of New York Inc, Nextel Communications of Mid-Atlantic Inc, Nextel of California Inc, Nextel West Corp, Cellco Partnership, AT & T Mobility, LLC., Dobson Cellular Systems Inc, MetroPCS Wireless, Inc., HELIO LLC, Kyocera Wireless Corp., LG Electronics MobileComm USA, Inc., Nokia Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc., Tracfone Wireless, Inc., Motorola, Inc., Virgin Mobile USA, LP, HTC America, Inc., Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Fred)
June 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 323 ORDER granting 322 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Joint ClaimConstruction and Prehearing Statement under P.R. 4-3 to June 19, 2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/15/09. (ehs, )
June 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 322 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadline to Complete and File a Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement Under P.R. 4-3 to June 19, 2009 by Sprint Spectrum L.P., Nextel of Texas Inc, Nextel South Corp, Nextel of New York Inc, Nextel Communications of Mid-Atlantic Inc, Nextel of California Inc, Nextel West Corp, Cellco Partnership, AT & T Mobility, LLC., Dobson Cellular Systems Inc, MetroPCS Wireless, Inc., HELIO LLC, Kyocera Wireless Corp., LG Electronics MobileComm USA, Inc., Nokia Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc., Tracfone Wireless, Inc., Motorola, Inc., Virgin Mobile USA, LP, HTC America, Inc., Samsung Telecommunications America LLC, Alltel Communication, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Fred)
June 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 321 ORDER granting 320 Motion to Amend/Correct. Deadline for all parties to complete and file a Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement pursuant to P.R. 4-3 is extended until June 12, 2009, replacing the previous order entered by this Court at Docket No. 319 that the deadline for all parties to exchange preliminary claim constructions and extrinsic evidence pursuant to P.R. 4-3 is extended until June 12, 2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/9/09. (ch, )
June 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 320 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct 319 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File, Unopposed Motion to Amend Court's Order Granting Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Extend the Deadline to Comply with P.R. 4-3 to June 12, 2009 by Sprint Spectrum L.P., Nextel of Texas Inc, Nextel South Corp, Nextel of New York Inc, Nextel Communications of Mid-Atlantic Inc, Nextel of California Inc, Nextel West Corp, Cellco Partnership, Helio, LLC, MetroPCS Wireless, Inc., Kyocera Wireless Corp., LG Electronics MobileComm USA, Inc., Nokia Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc., Tracfone Wireless, Inc., Motorola, Inc., Virgin Mobile USA, LP, HTC America, Inc., Samsung Telecommunications America LLC, AT&T Mobility, LLC, Dobson Cellular Systems, Inc., Alltel Communication, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Fred)
June 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 319 ORDER granting 317 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Deadline for all parties to exchange preliminary claim constructions and extrinsic evidence pursuant to P.R. 4-3 is extended until June 12, 2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/5/09. (ch, )
June 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 318 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven Mark Geiszler on behalf of Hewlett-Packard Company (Geiszler, Steven)
June 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 317 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Patent Rule 4-3 Statement by Sprint Spectrum L.P., Nextel of Texas Inc, Nextel South Corp, Nextel of New York Inc, Nextel Communications of Mid-Atlantic Inc, Nextel of California Inc, Nextel West Corp, Cellco Partnership, AT & T Mobility, LLC., Dobson Cellular Systems Inc, MetroPCS Wireless, Inc., Kyocera Wireless Corp., LG Electronics MobileComm USA, Inc., Nokia Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc., Tracfone Wireless, Inc., Motorola, Inc., Virgin Mobile USA, LP, HTC America, Inc., Samsung Telecommunications America LLC, Alltel Communication, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Williams, Fred)
May 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 316 NOTICE of Disclosure by Hewlett-Packard Company of Initial Disclosure Statement (Krevitt, Josh)
May 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 315 ORDER granting 314 Motion for Extension of Time to File. ORDERED that the deadline for the Parties to submit their Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement pursuant to Local Patent Rule 4-3 is extended until and including June 5, 2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 5/15/09. (ch, )
May 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 314 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement by Alltel Communications, LLC, Minerva Industries, Inc., Research In Motion Corporation, Motorola Inc, Nokia Inc., Alltel Communications Inc, A T & T Mobility LLC, Dobson Cellular Systems Inc, HELIO LLC, Hewlett-Packard Company, MetroPCS Wireless, Inc., Sprint Spectrum L.P., Nextel of Texas Inc, Nextel South Corp, Nextel of New York Inc, Nextel Communications of Mid-Atlantic Inc, Nextel of California Inc, Nextel West Corp, T-Mobile USA, Inc., Tracfone Wireless, Inc., Cellco Partnership, Virgin Mobile USA, LP, HTC America, Inc., Kyocera Wireless Corp., LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc., Palm, Inc., AT & T Mobility, LLC., Pantech Wireless, Inc., Sanyo North America Corporation, Utstarcom, Inc.,, Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications (USA), Inc., Samsung Telecommunications America LLC, Motorola, Inc., Alltel Communications, Inc., Dobson Cellular Systems Inc., LG Electronics MobileComm USA, Inc., AT&T Mobility, LLC, Dobson Cellular Systems, Inc., Helio, LLC, HTC America, Inc.,, Kyocera Wireless Corporation, LG Electronics Mobilecomm USA., Inc.,, Palm, Inc.,, Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC, Nokia, Inc., Alltel Communication, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chassman, Peter)
April 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 313 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Kathleen Burns McNamee for Hewlett-Packard Company. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 6-1-17684 (ch, )
April 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 312 ORDER granting 311 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney John L LaBarre terminated as counsel for deft Hewlett-Packard Co. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 4/20/09. (ehs, )
April 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 311 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Unopposed Motion for Withdrawal of Counsel as to John L. LaBarre) by Hewlett-Packard Company. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Charles)
April 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 310 NOTICE by Alltel Communications, LLC, Hewlett-Packard Company, MetroPCS Wireless, Inc., HELIO LLC, Kyocera Wireless Corp., LG Electronics MobileComm USA, Inc., Nokia Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc., Tracfone Wireless, Inc., Palm, Inc.,, Pantech Wireless, Inc., Sanyo North America Corporation, Utstarcom, Inc.,, Sony Ericsson Communications, (USA), Inc., Motorola, Inc., Virgin Mobile USA, LP, HTC America, Inc., Samsung Telecommunications America LLC, AT&T Mobility, LLC, Dobson Cellular Systems, Inc. of Compliance with P.R. 4-2 (Williams, Fred)
April 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 309 NOTICE by Minerva Industries, Inc. of Compliance re P.R. 4-2 (Fenster, Marc)
March 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 308 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kevin Alan Keeling on behalf of Research In Motion Corporation (Keeling, Kevin)
March 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 307 ORDER granting 306 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Deadline for parties to exchange preliminary claim construction and extrinsic evidence pursuant to P.R. 4-2 is extended until 3/31/09. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 3/17/09. (ch, )
March 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 306 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File or Extend Deadline to Comply with Patent Rule 4-2 to March 31, 2009 by Alltel Communications, LLC, Sprint Spectrum L.P., Nextel of Texas Inc, Nextel South Corp, Nextel of New York Inc, Nextel Communications of Mid-Atlantic Inc, Nextel of California Inc, Nextel West Corp, Cellco Partnership, MetroPCS Wireless, Inc., HELIO LLC, Kyocera Wireless Corp., LG Electronics MobileComm USA, Inc., Nokia Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc., Tracfone Wireless, Inc., Motorola, Inc., Virgin Mobile USA, LP, HTC America, Inc., Samsung Telecommunications America LLC, AT&T Mobility, LLC, Dobson Cellular Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Fred)
March 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 305 ORDER granting 303 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on March 9, 2009. (jml, )
March 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 304 ORDER granting 302 Motion for Leave to serve formal discovery on Plaintiff Minerva Industries, Inc. and/or third parties in compliance with the discovery limitations as set forth in the proposed Discovery Order submitted to the Court on May 29, 2008. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 3/6/09. (ehs, )
March 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 303 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File or Extend Deadline to Comply with Patent Rule 4-2 by Alltel Communications, LLC, Sprint Spectrum L.P., Nextel of Texas Inc, Nextel South Corp, Nextel of New York Inc, Nextel Communications of Mid-Atlantic Inc, Nextel of California Inc, Nextel West Corp, Cellco Partnership, MetroPCS Wireless, Inc., HELIO LLC, Kyocera Wireless Corp., LG Electronics MobileComm USA, Inc., Nokia Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc., Tracfone Wireless, Inc., Motorola, Inc., Virgin Mobile USA, LP, HTC America, Inc., Samsung Telecommunications America LLC, AT&T Mobility, LLC, Dobson Cellular Systems, Inc.. (Williams, Fred) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/6/2009: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (ch, ).
March 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 302 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File /Serve Formal Discovery by Alltel Communications, LLC, Research In Motion Corporation, Motorola Inc, Nokia Inc., Alltel Communications Inc, A T & T Mobility LLC, Dobson Cellular Systems Inc, HELIO LLC, Hewlett-Packard Company, MetroPCS Wireless, Inc., Sprint Spectrum L.P., Nextel of Texas Inc, Nextel South Corp, Nextel of New York Inc, Nextel Communications of Mid-Atlantic Inc, Nextel of California Inc, Nextel West Corp, T-Mobile USA, Inc., Tracfone Wireless, Inc., Cellco Partnership, Virgin Mobile USA, LP, HTC America, Inc., Kyocera Wireless Corp., LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc., Palm, Inc., AT & T Mobility, LLC., Pantech Wireless, Inc., Sanyo North America Corporation, Utstarcom, Inc.,, Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications (USA), Inc., Samsung Telecommunications America LLC, Motorola, Inc., Alltel Communications, Inc., Dobson Cellular Systems Inc., LG Electronics MobileComm USA, Inc., AT&T Mobility, LLC, Dobson Cellular Systems, Inc., Helio, LLC, HTC America, Inc.,, Kyocera Wireless Corporation, LG Electronics Mobilecomm USA., Inc.,, Palm, Inc.,, Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC, Nokia, Inc., Alltel Communication, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Chassman, Peter) Modified on 3/4/2009 (ch, ).
February 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 301 ORDER granting 229 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jedidiah Jarrett Rollins terminated as counsel for Minerva Industries Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 2/20/09. (ehs, ) Modified on 2/20/2009 to correct attorneys being terminated as Mr. Rollins only (ehs, ).
February 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 300 Minerva Reply to Sanyo Counterclaims ANSWER to 277 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Minerva Industries, Inc..(Fenster, Marc)
February 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 299 Minerva Reply to Pantech's Counterclaims ANSWER to 278 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Minerva Industries, Inc..(Fenster, Marc)
February 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 298 Minerva Reply to Alltel et al.'s Counterclaims ANSWER to 279 Answer to Amended Complaint,,, Counterclaim,, by Minerva Industries, Inc..(Fenster, Marc)
February 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 297 Minerva Reply to Utstarcom Counterclaims ANSWER to 284 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Minerva Industries, Inc..(Fenster, Marc)
February 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 296 Minerva Reply to Hewlett Packard's Counterclaims ANSWER to 282 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Minerva Industries, Inc..(Fenster, Marc)
February 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 295 Minerva Reply to Research in Motion's Counterclaims ANSWER to 276 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Minerva Industries, Inc..(Fenster, Marc)
February 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 294 Minerva Reply to Palm's Counterclaims ANSWER to 275 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Minerva Industries, Inc..(Fenster, Marc)
February 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 293 Minerva Reply to Sony Ericsson Counterclaims ANSWER to 280 Answer to Amended Complaint,, Counterclaim, by Minerva Industries, Inc..(Fenster, Marc)
February 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 292 NOTICE by Utstarcom, Inc., Defendant UTStarcom, Inc.'s Notice of Compliance with P.R. 4-1 (Smith, Melissa)
February 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 291 NOTICE by Pantech Wireless, Inc. Defendant Pantech Wireless' Notice of Compliance with P.R. 4-1 (Smith, Melissa)
February 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 290 NOTICE by Palm, Inc., Defendant Palm, Inc.'s Notice of Compliance with P.R. 4-1 (Smith, Melissa)
February 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 289 NOTICE by Research In Motion Corporation of Compliance Regarding P.R. 4-1 (Chassman, Peter)
February 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 288 NOTICE by Sanyo North America Corporation of Compliance with Patent Rule 4-1 (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Dorfman, Michael)
February 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 287 NOTICE by Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications (USA), Inc., Sony Ericsson Communications, (USA), Inc. Sony Ericsson's Notice of Compliance with P.R. 4-1 (Schulte, David)
February 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 286 NOTICE by Alltel Communications, LLC, Sprint Spectrum L.P., Nextel of Texas Inc, Nextel South Corp, Nextel of New York Inc, Nextel Communications of Mid-Atlantic Inc, Nextel of California Inc, Nextel West Corp, Cellco Partnership, MetroPCS Wireless, Inc., HELIO LLC, Kyocera Wireless Corp., LG Electronics MobileComm USA, Inc., Nokia Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc., Tracfone Wireless, Inc., Motorola, Inc., Virgin Mobile USA, LP, HTC America, Inc., Samsung Telecommunications America LLC, AT&T Mobility, LLC, Dobson Cellular Systems, Inc. of Compliance with P.R. 4-1 (Williams, Fred)
February 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 285 NOTICE by Minerva Industries, Inc. re Compliance with P.R. 4-1 (Fenster, Marc)
January 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 284 ***REPLACES #283*** ANSWER to 271 Amended Complaint,, Amended COUNTERCLAIM against Minerva Industries, Inc. by Utstarcom, Inc.,.(Melaugh, David) Modified on 1/21/2009 (mpv, ).
January 20, 2009 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Deficiency regarding #283 the ANSWER to 271 Amended Complaint,, Amended COUNTERCLAIM against Minerva Industries, Inc. by Utstarcom, Inc. submitted No Certificate of Service included on pleading. Attorney to correct and refile. Correction should be made by one business day. (mpv, )
January 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 283 ***FILED IN ERROR; PLEASE IGNORE*** ANSWER to 271 Amended Complaint,, Amended COUNTERCLAIM against Minerva Industries, Inc. by Utstarcom, Inc.,.(Tucher, Alison) Modified on 1/20/2009 (mpv, ).
January 16, 2009 Opinion or Order ***FILED IN ERROR, PER ATTY, ATTY WILL REFILE. Document # 281, Answer. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (sm, )
January 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 282 First Amended ANSWER to 271 Amended Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against all plaintiffs by Hewlett-Packard Company.(LaBarre, John)
January 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 281 ***FILED IN ERROR, PER ATTY, PLEASE IGNORE.***UTStarcom's ANSWER to 271 Amended Complaint,, Amended COUNTERCLAIM against Minerva Industries, Inc. by Utstarcom, Inc.,.(Tucher, Alison) Modified on 1/16/2009 (sm, ).
January 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 280 Sony Ericsson's ANSWER to 271 Amended Complaint, Sony Ericsson's Answer to Consolidated Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, and Amended Counterclaims, Amended COUNTERCLAIM against Minerva Industries, Inc. by Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications (USA), Inc., Sony Ericsson Communications, (USA), Inc..(Schulte, David)
January 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 279 Original ANSWER to 271 Amended Complaint, and Consolidated, COUNTERCLAIM against Minerva Industries, Inc. by Alltel Communications, LLC, Sprint Spectrum L.P., Nextel of Texas Inc, Nextel South Corp, Nextel of New York Inc, Nextel Communications of Mid-Atlantic Inc, Nextel of California Inc, Nextel West Corp, Cellco Partnership, MetroPCS Wireless, Inc., HELIO LLC, Kyocera Wireless Corp., LG Electronics MobileComm USA, Inc., Nokia Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc., Tracfone Wireless, Inc., Motorola, Inc., Virgin Mobile USA, LP, HTC America, Inc., Samsung Telecommunications America LLC, AT&T Mobility, LLC, Dobson Cellular Systems, Inc..(Williams, Fred)
January 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 278 Pantch Wireless, Inc.'s ANSWER to 271 Amended Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, and, COUNTERCLAIM against Minerva Industries, Inc. by Pantech Wireless, Inc..(Smith, Melissa)
January 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 277 ANSWER to 271 Amended Complaint, Consolidated Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Minerva Industries, Inc. by Sanyo North America Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Dorfman, Michael)
January 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 276 Research In Motion Corporation's ANSWER to 271 Amended Complaint, Consolidated Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM and Affirmative Defenses against Minerva Industries, Inc. by Research In Motion Corporation.(Chassman, Peter)
January 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 275 ANSWER to 271 Amended Complaint, Defendant Palm, Inc.'s Answer to Consolidated Complaint, Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims, COUNTERCLAIM against Minerva Industries, Inc. by Palm, Inc..(Smith, Melissa)
December 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 274 REPLY to Response to Motion re 259 MOTION for Protective Order and Memorandum in Support Thereof filed by Dobson Cellular Systems Inc, Helio, LLC, MetroPCS Wireless, Inc., Kyocera Wireless Corp., LG Electronics MobileComm USA, Inc., Nokia Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc., Tracfone Wireless, Inc., Virgin Mobil USA, LLC, Motorola, Inc., Alltel Communications, Inc., HTC America, Inc., Samsung Telecommunications America LLC, AT&T Mobility, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exh. A, # 2 Exhibit Exh. B, # 3 Exhibit Exh. C, # 4 Exhibit Exh. D, # 5 Exhibit Exh. E, # 6 Exhibit Exh. F)(Park, Jin-Suk)
December 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 273 Additional Attachments to Main Document: 271 Amended Complaint, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (Fenster, Marc) Modified on 12/16/2008 (mpv, ).
December 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 272 NOTICE by Palm, Inc., Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (Stevens, Scott)
December 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 271 AMENDED COMPLAINT CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT against all defendants, filed by Minerva Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Part 1 of 2, # 2 Exhibit A Part 2 of 2, # 3 Exhibit B Part 1 of 2, # 4 Exhibit B Part 2 of 2)(Fenster, Marc)
December 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 270 AMENDED ANSWER to Minerva's Complaint originally filed in C.A. No. 2-08-cv-00020 Research in Motion Corp's First, Amended COUNTERCLAIM against Minerva Industries, Inc. by Research In Motion Corporation. (Chassman, Peter)
December 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 269 AMENDED ANSWER to Minerva's Complaint originally filed in C.A. No. 2-07-cv-230 Research in Motion Corp's Second, Amended COUNTERCLAIM against Minerva Industries, Inc. by Research In Motion Corporation. (Chassman, Peter)
December 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 268 RESPONSE in Opposition re 259 MOTION for Protective Order and Memorandum in Support Thereof filed by Minerva Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Marc A. Fenster)(Fenster, Marc)
December 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 267 NOTICE by Palm, Inc., re 259 MOTION for Protective Order and Memorandum in Support Thereof Palm's Notice of Intent to Join Defendants' Motion for Protective Order (Duh, Christine)
December 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 266 NOTICE by Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications (USA), Inc., Sony Ericsson Communications, (USA), Inc. re 259 MOTION for Protective Order and Memorandum in Support Thereof Sony Ericsson's Notice of Intent to Join Defendants' Motion for Protective Order (Schulte, David)
December 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 265 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David Curtis Schulte on behalf of Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications (USA), Inc., Sony Ericsson Communications, (USA), Inc. (Schulte, David)
December 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 264 NOTICE by Research In Motion Corporation re 231 MOTION to Limit the Number of Asserted Patent Claims -Notice of Intent to Join Motion to Limit the Number of Asserted Patent Claims (Chassman, Peter)
December 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 263 NOTICE by Research In Motion Corporation re 259 MOTION for Protective Order and Memorandum in Support Thereof -Notice of Intent to Join Defendants' Motion for Protective Order (Chassman, Peter)
December 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 262 NOTICE by Minerva Industries, Inc. of Compliance with Discovery Order (Fenster, Marc)
December 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 261 ORDER granting 230 Motion to Consolidate Cases. Cases captioned Minerva Industries, Inc. v. Research in Motion Corporation, et al., Civil Action No. 2:07-cv-230; Minerva Industries, Inc. v. Research in Motion Corporation, et al., Civil Action No. 2:08-cv-20; and Minerva Industries, Inc. v. Motorola, Inc., et al., Civil Action No. 2:08-cv-21, all currently pending in this Court before The Honorable T. John Ward, be transferred to Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham, IV, and be consolidated with the instant action currently pending before Judge Everingham for all purposes including discovery, claim construction and trial. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 12/1/08. (ch, )
November 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 260 NOTICE of Disclosure by Pantech Wireless, Inc. Notice of Defendant Pantech Wireless' Additional Disclosures (Smith, Melissa)
November 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 259 MOTION for Protective Order and Memorandum in Support Thereof by Alltel Communications, LLC, MetroPCS Wireless, Inc., HELIO LLC, Kyocera Wireless Corp., LG Electronics MobileComm USA, Inc., Nokia Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc., Tracfone Wireless, Inc., Virgin Mobil USA, LLC, Motorola, Inc., HTC America, Inc., Samsung Telecommunications America LLC, AT&T Mobility, LLC, Dobson Cellular Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13)(Williams, Fred)
November 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 258 ORDER granting 257 Motion for Extension of Time to serve additional disclosures. Deadline extended to 11/24/08. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 11/18/08. (ehs, )
November 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 257 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File / Serve Additional Disclosures by Alltel Communications, LLC, MetroPCS Wireless, Inc., HELIO LLC, Kyocera Wireless Corp., Nokia Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc., Tracfone Wireless, Inc., Virgin Mobil USA, LLC, Motorola, Inc., HTC America, Inc., LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc., Samsung Telecommunications America LLC, AT&T Mobility, LLC, Dobson Cellular Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Fred)
November 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 256 NOTICE of Disclosure by Pantech Wireless, Inc. Notice of Defendant Pantech Wireless P.R. 3-4(a) Supplemental Disclosures (Smith, Melissa)
November 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 255 NOTICE by Sanyo North America Corporation re 226 Order,,, Set Deadlines/Hearings,, Notice of production of P.R.3-4 documents (Cone, John)
November 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 254 NOTICE by Alltel Communications, LLC, MetroPCS Wireless, Inc., HELIO LLC, Kyocera Wireless Corp., LG Electronics MobileComm USA, Inc., Nokia Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc., Tracfone Wireless, Inc., Virgin Mobil USA, LLC, Motorola, Inc., HTC America, Inc., Samsung Telecommunications America LLC, AT&T Mobility, LLC, Dobson Cellular Systems, Inc. of Compliance with P.R. 3-4 Document Production (Williams, Fred)
November 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 253 NOTICE of Disclosure by Sony Ericsson Communications, (USA), Inc. (Notice of Compliance with P.R. 3-3 & 3-4) (Schulte, David)
November 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 252 NOTICE by Alltel Communications, LLC, Hewlett-Packard Company, MetroPCS Wireless, Inc., HELIO LLC, Kyocera Wireless Corp., LG Electronics MobileComm USA, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc., Tracfone Wireless, Inc., HTC America, Inc.,, Palm, Inc.,, Pantech Wireless, Inc., Sanyo North America Corporation, Utstarcom, Inc.,, Sony Ericsson Communications, (USA), Inc., Motorola, Inc., Nokia, Inc., Alltel Communications, Inc., Virgin Mobile USA, LP, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC, AT&T Mobility, LLC, Dobson Cellular Systems, Inc. Notice of Compliance for Joint Invalidity Contentions (Williams, Fred)
November 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 251 NOTICE of Disclosure by Utstarcom, Inc., Notice of Defendant Utstarcom., Inc.'s Compliance with P.R. 3-4(a) Disclosures (Smith, Melissa)
November 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 250 NOTICE of Disclosure by Palm, Inc., Regarding P.R. 3-4(a) Disclosures (Smith, Melissa)
November 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 249 NOTICE of Disclosure by Pantech Wireless, Inc. Regarding First Supplemental Disclosures (Smith, Melissa)
November 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 248 NOTICE of Disclosure by Pantech Wireless, Inc. Notice of Defendant Pantech Wireless' Compliance with P.R. 3-4(a) Disclosures (Smith, Melissa)
October 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 247 NOTICE by Sony Ericsson Communications, (USA), Inc. re 245 Reply to Response to Motion,, 231 MOTION to Limit the Number of Asserted Patent Claims Notice of Errata by Defendants (Wynne, Richard)
October 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 246 NOTICE of Disclosure by Nokia Inc. Nokia Inc.'s Notice of Service of Initial Disclosures (Williams, Fred)
September 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 245 REPLY to Response to Motion re 231 MOTION to Limit the Number of Asserted Patent Claims filed by Hewlett-Packard Company, Kyocera Wireless Corp., LG Electronics MobileComm USA, Inc., Nokia Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc., Tracfone Wireless, Inc., Virgin Mobil USA, LLC, Palm, Inc.,, Pantech Wireless, Inc., Sanyo North America Corporation, Utstarcom, Inc.,, Sony Ericsson Communications, (USA), Inc., Motorola, Inc., Alltel Communications, Inc., HTC America, Inc., Samsung Telecommunications America LLC, AT&T Mobility, LLC, Dobson Cellular Systems, Inc.. (Wynne, Richard)
September 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 244 NOTICE of Disclosure by Minerva Industries, Inc. (Fenster, Marc)
September 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 243 RESPONSE in Opposition re 231 MOTION to Limit the Number of Asserted Patent Claims filed by Minerva Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fenster, Marc)
September 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 242 NOTICE of Disclosure by Tracfone Wireless, Inc. (Williams, Fred)
September 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 241 ORDER granting 233 Motion for Extension of Time to serve Rule 26 disclosure. Deadline extended to 9/18/08. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 9/17/08. (ehs, )
September 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 240 NOTICE of Disclosure by Alltel Communications, LLC, MetroPCS Wireless, Inc., HELIO LLC, Kyocera Wireless Corp., T-Mobile USA, Inc., Virgin Mobil USA, LLC, Motorola, Inc., HTC America, Inc., LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc., Samsung Telecommunications America LLC, AT&T Mobility, LLC, Dobson Cellular Systems, Inc. (Williams, Fred)
September 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 239 NOTICE of Disclosure by Pantech Wireless, Inc. (Smith, Melissa)
September 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 238 ORDER granting 232 Motion for Extension of Time to Serve Rule 26 Initial Disclosures. Deadline for Nokia Inc. is extended to 10/1/08. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 9/16/08. (ch, )
September 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 237 NOTICE by Sanyo North America Corporation of Service of Initial Disclosures (Cone, John)
September 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 236 NOTICE of Disclosure by Utstarcom, Inc., (Smith, Melissa)
September 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 235 NOTICE of Disclosure by Palm, Inc., (Smith, Melissa)
September 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 234 NOTICE of Disclosure by Sony Ericsson Communications, (USA), Inc. (Wynne, Richard)
September 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 233 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File TracFone Wireless, Inc.'s Rule 26 Initial Disclosures (Unopposed) by Tracfone Wireless, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Fred)
September 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 232 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Nokia Inc.'s Rule 26 Initial Disclosures (Unopposed) by Nokia Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Fred)
September 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 231 MOTION to Limit the Number of Asserted Patent Claims by Hewlett-Packard Company, Kyocera Wireless Corp., LG Electronics MobileComm USA, Inc., Nokia Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc., Tracfone Wireless, Inc., Virgin Mobil USA, LLC, Palm, Inc.,, Pantech Wireless, Inc., Sanyo North America Corporation, Utstarcom, Inc.,, Sony Ericsson Communications, (USA), Inc., Motorola, Inc., Alltel Communications, Inc., HTC America, Inc., Samsung Telecommunications America LLC, AT&T Mobility, LLC, Dobson Cellular Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Wynne, Richard)
August 14, 2008 Opinion or Order NOTICE re 230 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed Proposed Order now added as attachment to document by clerk. (mpv, )
August 13, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 230 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Minerva Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 to Motion to Consolidate)(Fenster, Marc) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/14/2008: # 2 Text of Proposed Order) (mpv, ).
June 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: Markman Hearing set for 1/6/2010 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham. (ehs, )
June 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 229 Consent MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Minerva Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Abernathy, Nancy)
June 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 228 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nancy Claire Abernathy on behalf of Minerva Industries, Inc. (Abernathy, Nancy)
June 2, 2008 Opinion or Order ***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 227, NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nancy Claire Abernathy on behalf of Minerva Industries, Inc. PLEASE IGNORE. PEr ATTORNEY WRONG DOCUMENT ATTACHED. ATTORNEY WILL REFILE CORRECTLY*** (mpv, )
June 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 227 ***FILED IN ERROR; PLEASE IGNORE***NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nancy Claire Abernathy on behalf of Minerva Industries, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Abernathy, Nancy) Modified on 6/2/2008 (mpv, ).
May 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 226 DOCKET CONTROL ORDER - Amended Pleadings due by 12/15/2008. Discovery due by 4/23/2010. Joinder of Parties due by 12/15/2008. Markman Hearing set for 1/6/2010 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham. Motions due by 5/6/2010. Pretrial Order due by 5/25/2010. Jury Selection set for 6/7/2010 09:00AM before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham. Pretrial Conference set for 5/27/2010 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 5/30/08. (ehs, ) Modified on 6/5/2008 to correct date of markman hearing - hearing reset (ehs, ).
May 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 225 Consent MOTION (Agreed Motion for Entry of Agreed Docket Control Order and Submission of Parties' Discovery Proposals) by Minerva Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Docket Control Order, # 2 Exhibit B - Parties' Proposals for Discovery Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
May 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 224 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jedidiah Jarrett Rollins on behalf of Minerva Industries, Inc. (Rollins, Jedidiah)
May 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 223 ORDER granting 221 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Deadline extended to 5/29/08 for pltf to comply with PR 3-1 and 3-2. Signed by Judge Charles Everingham on 5/16/08. (ehs, )
May 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 222 ORDER granting 220 Motion for Extension of Time to File docket control orders and discovery order. Deadline extended to 5/29/08. Signed by Judge Charles Everingham on 5/16/08. (ehs, )
May 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 221 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (Serve P.R. 3-1 and 3-2 Disclosures) by Minerva Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Maloney, Collin)
May 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 220 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Docket Control Order and Discovery Order by Minerva Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Maloney, Collin)
May 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 219 ORDER assigning case to Judge Everingham by consent of the parties for all further proceedings and entry of judgment. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 5/1/08. (ch, )
May 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge T. John Ward and Judge Charles Everingham: Status Conference held on 5/01/08. Counsel for the parties appeared and were asked if they consented to Judge Everingham. Depending on their answer, they were then given Markman and jury selection dates for the appropriate court. The parties are to meet and confer regarding a scheduling order and discovery order, and the parties have 14 days to submit the proposed orders. Court adjourned. (Court Reporter Susan Simmons.) (shd, )
May 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 218 CONSENT to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham. (ch, )
April 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 217 ORDER granting 216 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Michael Edwin Jones terminated as counsel of record for Dobson Cellular Systems. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 4/29/08. (ch, )
April 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 216 Consent MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Dobson Cellular Systems Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
April 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 215 NOTICE by Palm, Inc., Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (Stevens, Scott)
April 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ORDER - This case is set for a Status Conference on May 1, 2008. In keeping with the Court's recent practice, the Court intends to give the parties an opportunity, following the conference, to reach agreements on the Docket Control Order and Discovery Order without having to return for an additional conference with the Court. Accordingly, the Court orders that disclosures under P. R. 3-1 and P. R. 3-2 are due on Friday, May 16, 2008. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 4/11/08. (ehs, )
April 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 213 ORDER granting 210 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Added attorney Melissa Richards Smith for Palm, Inc.. Attorney Scott English Stevens terminated as Palm, Inc. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 4/11/08. (ch, )
April 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 212 NOTICE by Minerva Industries, Inc. Notice of Change of Firm Name and Electronic Addresses (DeRieux, Elizabeth)
April 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 211 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Edwin Jones on behalf of Motorola, Inc. (Jones, Michael)
April 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 210 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Unopposed Motion to Withdraw and Substitute Counsel by Palm, Inc.,. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
April 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 209 Minerva Reply to HTC et al.'s Counterclaims ANSWER to Counterclaim by Minerva Industries, Inc..(Fenster, Marc)
April 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ORDER - Status Conference set for 5/1/2008 09:00 AM before Judge T. John Ward, and Judge Chad Everingham. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 4/3/08. (ch, )
April 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 207 ORDER granting 206 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Andy Tindel terminated as counsel of record for Dft HTC America Inc. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 4/2/08. (ch, )
April 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 206 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by HTC America, Inc.,. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tindel, Andy)
March 31, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 205 First Amended ANSWER to Complaint and, COUNTERCLAIM against Minerva Industries, Inc. by MetroPCS Wireless, Inc., HELIO LLC, Kyocera Wireless Corp., LG Electronics MobileComm USA, Inc., Nokia Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc., Tracfone Wireless, Inc., Motorola, Inc., Virgin Mobile USA, LP, HTC America, Inc., Samsung Telecommunications America LLC, AT&T Mobility, LLC, Dobson Cellular Systems, Inc., Alltel Communication, Inc..(Williams, Fred)
March 31, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORDER granting 203 Motion for Leave to File first amended answer and counterclaim. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 3/31/08. (ehs, )
March 27, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 203 Consent MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Answer and Counterclaim by HTC America, Inc., LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc., Samsung Telecommunications America LLC, AT&T Mobility, LLC, Dobson Cellular Systems, Inc., MetroPCS Wireless, Inc., HELIO LLC, Kyocera Wireless Corp., Nokia Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc., Tracfone Wireless, Inc., Motorola, Inc., Virgin Mobile USA, LP, Alltel Communication, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Fred)
March 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 202 Minerva Reply to UTStarcom Amended Counterclaims ANSWER to Counterclaim by Minerva Industries, Inc..(Fenster, Marc)
March 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 201 SECOND AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Minerva Industries, Inc. by Utstarcom, Inc.,.(ehs, )
March 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 200 ORDER granting 199 Motion for Leave to File second amended answer by deft UTStarcom,Inc.. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 3/5/08. (ehs, )
March 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 199 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Answer by Utstarcom, Inc.,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Answer)# 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Tucher, Alison)
February 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 198 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Fred Irvin Williams on behalf of HTC America, Inc.,, High Tech Computer Corp. (Williams, Fred)
February 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 197 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven M Zager on behalf of High Tech Computer Corp., HTC America, Inc., (Zager, Steven)
February 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 196 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Carl R Roth on behalf of Nokia Inc., Nokia, Inc. (Roth, Carl)
February 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 195 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Amanda Aline Abraham on behalf of Nokia Inc., Nokia, Inc. (Abraham, Amanda)
February 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 194 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brendan Clay Roth on behalf of Nokia Inc., Nokia, Inc. (Roth, Brendan)
February 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 193 RESPONSE to 187 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim Reply to UTStarcom Amended Counterclaims by Minerva Industries, Inc.. (Fenster, Marc)
January 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 192 Minerva Reply to Pantech Counterclaims ANSWER to Counterclaim by Minerva Industries, Inc..(Fenster, Marc)
January 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 191 Minerva Reply to Hewlett-Packard Counterclaims ANSWER to Counterclaim by Minerva Industries, Inc..(Fenster, Marc)
January 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 190 Minerva Reply to Kyocera/LG Electronics/Motorola/Nokia/Samsang/4 Alltel/AT&T/Dobson/2Helio/3 MetroPCS/T-Mobile/TracFone/Virgin Counterclaims ANSWER to Counterclaim by Minerva Industries, Inc..(Fenster, Marc)
January 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 189 Minerva Reply to Palm Counterclaims ANSWER to Counterclaim by Minerva Industries, Inc..(Fenster, Marc)
January 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 188 Minerva Reply to UTStarcom Counterclaims ANSWER to Counterclaim by Minerva Industries, Inc..(Fenster, Marc)
January 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 187 FIRST AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand, Amended COUNTERCLAIM against Minerva Industries, Inc. by Utstarcom, Inc.,.(Tucher, Alison)
January 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 186 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Eric B Carlson for Minerva Industries, Inc. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 6-1-12493(ch, )
January 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER granting 183 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs claims against Helio, Inc., MetroPCS, Inc., and MetroPCS Texas, LLC are hereby dismissed without prejudice. Each party shall bear its own costs, expenses, and attorney fees.. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 1/22/08. (ch, )
January 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ORDER granting 182 Motion to Dismiss. Claim against Alltel Communications Wireless, Inc., Alltel Communications of Tekarkana, Inc., and Alltel Wireless of Texarkana, LLC are hereby dismissed with prejudice. Each party shall bear its own costs, expenses, and attorneys fees. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 1/22/08. (ch, )
January 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 183 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Voluntarily Without Prejudice by Helio, Inc., MetroPCS, Inc., Metropcs Texas, LLC, Minerva Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Fred)
January 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 182 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Voluntarily Without Prejudice by Alltel Wireless of Texarkana, LLC., Alltel Wireless of Texarkana, LLC, Minerva Industries, Inc., Alltel Communications Wireless, Inc., Alltel Communications of Texarkana, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Zager, Steven)
January 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER granting 180 Motion to Withdraw John A Kennedy, Michael J. LaBrie, Michael D. McClintock and Charles L. McLawhorn, III of McAfee & Taft AProfessional Corporation as counsel of record for Defendant Dobson Cellular Systems, Inc.. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 1/15/08. (ehs, )
January 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 180 MOTION to Withdraw of Counsel by Dobson Cellular Systems Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McClintock, Michael)
January 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER granting 174 Joint Motion of Voluntary Dismissal of the following dfts: Alltel Corporation, Boost Mobile, LLC., LG Electronics USA., Inc., Nokia Mobile Phones, Inc., Samsung Electronics America, Samsung Telecommunications America, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Wireless Broadband, SunCom Wireless Operating Co., Verizon Communication, Verizon Wireless Service. Each party shall bear its own costs, expenses and attorney fees. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 1/8/08. (ch, )
January 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 178 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert Christopher Bunt on behalf of Hewlett-Packard Company (Bunt, Robert)
January 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 177 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Charles Ainsworth on behalf of Hewlett-Packard Company (Ainsworth, Charles)
January 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ANSWER to Complaint by HTC America, Inc.,.(Heit, Warren)
January 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and, COUNTERCLAIM against Minerva Industries, Inc. by Alltel Communications, Inc., Virgin Mobile USA, LP, AT & T Mobility, LLC., Dobson Cellular Systems Inc, Helio, Inc., MetroPCS, Inc., Metropcs Texas, LLC, MetroPCS Wireless, Inc., Alltel Wireless of Texarkana, LLC, HELIO LLC, Kyocera Wireless Corp., LG Electronics MobileComm USA, Inc., Nokia Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc., Tracfone Wireless, Inc., Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC, Motorola, Inc., Alltel Communications Wireless, Inc., Alltel Communications of Texarkana, Inc..(Williams, Fred)
January 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 174 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Voluntarily Without Prejudice by Boost Mobile, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Wireless Broadband Company, LLC, Suncom Wireless Operating Company, LLC, Verizon Communications, Inc., Minerva Industries, Inc., Verizon Wireless Services, LLC, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., LG Electronics USA, Inc., Samsung TeleCommunications America, Inc., Nokia Mobile Phones, Inc., Alltel Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Fred)
January 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand Pantech Wireless, Inc.'s Answer, Affirmative Defenses, and Counterclaims to Minerva's Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Minerva Industries, Inc. by Pantech Wireless, Inc..(Smith, Melissa)
January 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 172 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Palm, Inc., identifying None as Corporate Parent. (Stevens, Scott)
January 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 171 Defendant Palm, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and, COUNTERCLAIM against Minerva Industries, Inc. by Palm, Inc.,.(Stevens, Scott)
January 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 170 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Hewlett-Packard Company identifying None as Corporate Parent. (Krevitt, Josh) Modified on 1/7/2008 (mpv, ).
January 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against Minerva Industries, Inc. by Hewlett-Packard Company.(Krevitt, Josh)
January 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against Minerva Industries, Inc. by Utstarcom, Inc.,.(Tucher, Alison)
January 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ANSWER to Complaint by Sanyo North America Corporation.(Cone, John)
January 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER granting 163 Motion to Dismiss. ORDERED that the answer of HTC Corporation of Texas be STRICKEN, and HTC Corporation of Texas otherwise be absolved of any further obligations with respect to this litigation. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 1/2/08. (ehs, )
January 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER granting 164 Motion to Dismiss. Claims against Southern Communications Services is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 1/2/08. (ch, )
December 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 164 Consent MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice Southern Communications Services, Inc., d/b/a SouthernLINC Wireless by Minerva Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Maloney, Collin)
December 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 163 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Stipulation of Dismissal Striking HTC Corporation's Answer by Minerva Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Maloney, Collin)
December 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 162 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Scott English Stevens on behalf of Palm, Inc., (Stevens, Scott)
December 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER granting 160 Motion to Dismiss deft Qwest Wireless, LLC without prejudice. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 12/19/07. (ehs, )
December 18, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 160 Consent MOTION to Dismiss Voluntarily and Without Prejudice of Qwest Wireless, LLC by Minerva Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Maloney, Collin)
December 13, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER granting 158 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Hewlett-Packard Company deadline is extended to 1/7/08. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 12/13/7. (ch, )
December 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 158 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Hewlett-Packard Company. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(LaBarre, John)
December 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ANSWER to Counterclaim of Sony Ericsson by Minerva Industries, Inc..(Maloney, Collin)
November 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER granting 153 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer until 1/7/08. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 11/21/07. (djh, )
November 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER that pla's claims against dft U S Cellular Wireless, Samsung America, Inc and Kyocera America, Inc are hereby dismissed without prejudice to refiling same. Each party shall bear their own costs. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 11/21/07. (djh, )
November 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 154 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John L LaBarre on behalf of Hewlett-Packard Company (LaBarre, John)
November 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 153 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Sanyo North America Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cone, John)
November 16, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 152 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jin-Suk Park on behalf of MetroPCS, Inc., Metropcs Texas, LLC, MetroPCS Wireless, Inc., Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Wireless Broadband Company, LLC, Nokia Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc., Tracfone Wireless, Inc., Virgin Mobil USA, LLC, Southern Communications Services, Inc. d/b/a SouthernLINC Wireless, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung TeleCommunications America, Inc., Motorola, Inc. (Park, Jin-Suk)
November 16, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 151 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Frank C Cimino for Kyocera Wireless Corp. and Nokia Inc. Samsung, LG Electronics, Motorla, Inc.(APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 2-1-3247 (ch, )
November 16, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 149 NOTICE by Minerva Industries, Inc. of Dismissal without Prejudice of U.S. Cellular Wireless, Samsung America, Inc. and Kyocera America, Inc. (Maloney, Collin) Additional attachment(s) added on 11/20/2007 (sm, ).
November 15, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 150 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Julia K Smith for AT & T Mobility, LLC. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 2-1-3242. (ch, )
November 15, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 148 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Sony Ericsson Communications, (USA), Inc. identifying Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications AB as Corporate Parent. (Wynne, Richard)
November 15, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ANSWER to Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Minerva Industries, Inc. by Sony Ericsson Communications, (USA), Inc..(Wynne, Richard)
November 15, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ***STRICKEN PER ORDER # 166 *** Original ANSWER to Complaint by HTC Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Smith, David) Modified on 1/3/2008 (ehs, ).
November 8, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 145 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Kyle D Chen for HTC Corporation and HTC America, Inc. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 2-1-3209. (ch, )
November 7, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 144 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Southern Communications Services, Inc. d/b/a SouthernLINC Wireless identifying Southern Company as Corporate Parent. (Williams, Fred)
November 2, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 143 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Bruce D DeRenzi for AT & T Mobility, LLC. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 2-1-3185. (ch, )
November 2, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 142 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Andrew M Riddles for AT & T Mobility, LLC. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 2-1-3185 (ch, )
November 2, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 141 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey Kirk Sherwood on behalf of Boost Mobile, Helio, Inc., MetroPCS, Inc., Metropcs Texas, LLC, MetroPCS Wireless, Inc., Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Wireless Broadband Company, LLC, HELIO LLC, Kyocera Wireless Corp., LG Electronics MobileComm USA, Inc., Nokia Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc., Tracfone Wireless, Inc., Virgin Mobil USA, LLC, Southern Communications Services, Inc. d/b/a SouthernLINC Wireless, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC, LG Electronics USA, Inc., Motorola, Inc. (Sherwood, Jeffrey)
November 1, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 140 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James N Haltom on behalf of AT & T Mobility, LLC. (Haltom, James)
November 1, 2007 Opinion or Order Answer Due Deadline Updated for Verizon Communications, Inc. to 1/7/2008; Verizon Wireless Services, LLC to 1/7/2008. (ch, )
November 1, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER granting 136 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Verizon Communications, Inc and Verizon Wireless Services, LLC Deadline is extended to 1/7/08. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 10/31/07. (ch, )
October 31, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 138 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven M Zager on behalf of LG Electronics USA, Inc., Boost Mobile, Helio, Inc., MetroPCS, Inc., Metropcs Texas, LLC, MetroPCS Wireless, Inc., Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Wireless Broadband Company, LLC, HELIO LLC, Kyocera Wireless Corp., LG Electronics MobileComm USA, Inc., Nokia Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc., Tracfone Wireless, Inc., Virgin Mobil USA, LLC, Southern Communications Services, Inc. d/b/a SouthernLINC Wireless, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC, Motorola, Inc. (Zager, Steven)
October 31, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 137 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Todd Eric Landis on behalf of Metropcs Texas, LLC, Tracfone Wireless, Inc., Boost Mobile, Helio, Inc., MetroPCS, Inc., MetroPCS Wireless, Inc., Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Wireless Broadband Company, LLC, HELIO LLC, Kyocera Wireless Corp., LG Electronics MobileComm USA, Inc., Nokia Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc., Virgin Mobil USA, LLC, LG Electronics, USA, Inc.,, Southern Communications Services, Inc. d/b/a SouthernLINC Wireless, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC, Motorola, Inc. (Landis, Todd)
October 30, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 136 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File DEFENDANTS' SECOND UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER, MOVE OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL COMPLAINT by Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon Wireless Services, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bufe, John)
October 24, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 135 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Minerva Industries, Inc.. Southernlinc Wireless served by CMRR on 10/1/2007, answer due 10/22/2007. (ch, )
October 24, 2007 Opinion or Order Answer Due Deadline Updated for Boost Mobile to 1/7/2008; Sprint Nextel Corporation to 1/7/2008; Southern Communications Services, Inc. d/b/a SouthernLINC Wireless to 1/7/2008. (ch, )
October 24, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER granting 128 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Dfts Boost Mobile, Sprint Nextel Corporation and Southern Communications Services, Inc. deadline is extended to 1/7/08 . Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 10/24/07. (ch, )
October 23, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER granting 127 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Andrew Wesley Spangler terminated as counsel of record for Minerva Industries, Inc.. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 10/23/07. (ch, )
October 22, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 129 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Minerva Industries, Inc.. Sprint Nextel Corporation served by CMRR on 10/1/2007, answer due 10/22/2007. (ch, )
October 22, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 128 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,,,,, (Unopposed) by Southern Communications Services, Inc. d/b/a SouthernLINC Wireless, Boost Mobile, Sprint Nextel Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Fred)
October 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 127 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Plaintiff Minerva Industries, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion to Withdraw Andrew W. Spangler as Counsel for Plaintiff by Minerva Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Capshaw, Sidney)
October 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 132 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Christine E Duh for Palm, Inc.(FEE PAID) 2-1-3142 (ehs, )
October 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 131 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Anna T Lee for Palm, Inc. (FEE PAID) 2-1-3142 (ehs, )
October 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 130 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Mark Donnell Flanagan for Palm, Inc. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 2-1-3142. (ch, )
October 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 126 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Rachel M Vorbeck for Sanyo North America Corporation. (FEE PAID) 2-1-3135 (ehs, )
October 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 125 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Timothy J Vezeau for Sanyo North America Corporation. (FEE PAID) 2-1-3135 (ehs, )
October 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 124 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Breighanne A Eggert for Sanyo North America Corporation. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 2-1-3135 (ch, )
October 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 123 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Michael A Dorfman for Sanyo North America Corporation. (APPROVED) (FEE PAID) 2-1-3135 (ch, )
October 18, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 122 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Charles L McLawhorn, II for Dobson Cellular Systems Inc. (APPROVE)(FEE PAID) 6-1-11442 (ch, )
October 18, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 121 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Michael J LaBrie for Dobson Cellular Systems Inc. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 6-1-11442 (ch, )
October 18, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 120 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Michael D McClintock for Dobson Cellular Systems Inc. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 6-1-11442 (ch, )
October 18, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 119 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney John A Kenney for Dobson Cellular Systems Inc. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 6-1-11442 (ch, )
October 18, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 118 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Harold J McElhinny for Qwest Wireless, LLC and Utstarcom, Inc. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 2-1-3132. (ch, )
October 18, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 117 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Alison M Tucher for Qwest Wireless, LLC and Utstarcom, Inc. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 2-1-3132. (ch, )
October 18, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 116 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney David E Melaugh for Qwest Wireless, LLC and Utstarcom, Inc. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 2-1-3132. (ch, )
October 18, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 115 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by T-Mobile USA, Inc. identifying T-Mobile Global Holding GmbH as having greater than 10% ownership of any class of stock in T-Mobile USA, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Williams, Fred)
October 18, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 114 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Kyocera Wireless Corp. identifying Kyocera International, Inc. as corporate parent. The parent corporation of Kyocera International, Inc. is Kyocera Corporation. as Corporate Parent. (Williams, Fred)
October 18, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 113 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Minerva Industries, Inc.. Boost Mobile served by CMRR on 10/1/2007, answer due 10/22/2007. (ch, )
October 18, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 112 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Minerva Industries, Inc.. Verizon Communications, Inc. served BY CMRR on 10/1/2007, answer due 10/22/2007. (ch, )
October 18, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 111 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Dobson Cellular Systems Inc identifying Dobson Communications Corporation as Corporate Parent. (Jones, Michael)
October 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 110 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Alltel Wireless of Texarkana, LLC, Alltel Corporation, Alltel Communications Wireless, Inc., Alltel Communication, Inc., Alltel Communications of Texarkana, Inc. identifying Alltel Corporation as the corporate parent of Alltel Communications of Texarkana, Inc., Alltel Communications Wireless, Inc., Alltel Communications, Inc., and Alltel Wireless of Texarkana, LLC as Corporate Parent. (Williams, Fred)
October 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 109 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Sprint Nextel Corporation identifying Sprint Nextel has no parent corporation as Corporate Parent. (Williams, Fred)
October 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 108 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by AT & T Mobility, LLC. (Doan, Darby)
October 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Answer Due Deadline Updated for Helio, Inc. to 1/7/2008; MetroPCS, Inc. to 1/7/2008; Metropcs Texas, LLC to 1/7/2008; MetroPCS Wireless, Inc. to 1/7/2008; Sprint Wireless Broadband Company, LLC to 1/7/2008; Alltel Wireless of Texarkana, LLC to 1/7/2008; HELIO LLC to 1/7/2008; Kyocera Wireless Corp. to 1/7/2008; LG Electronics MobileComm USA, Inc. to 1/7/2008; Nokia Inc. to 1/7/2008; T-Mobile USA, Inc. to 1/7/2008; Tracfone Wireless, Inc. to 1/7/2008; Virgin Mobil USA, LLC to 1/7/2008; LG Electronics, USA, Inc., to 1/7/2008; Samsung Electronics America, Inc. to 1/7/2008; Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC to 1/7/2008; Motorola, Inc. to 1/7/2008; Alltel Corporation to 1/7/2008; Alltel Communications Wireless, Inc. to 1/7/2008; Alltel Communication, Inc. to 1/7/2008; Alltel Communications of Texarkana, Inc. to 1/7/2008. (ehs, )
October 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER granting 82 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Deadline for defts extended to 1/7/08 . Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 10/17/07. (ehs, )
October 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Answer Due Deadline Updated for Utstarcom, Inc., to 1/7/2008. (ch, )
October 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER granting 83 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Utstarcom, Inc. deadline is extended to 1/7/08 . Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 10/17/07. (ch, )
October 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Answer Due Deadline Updated for Suncom Wireless Operating Company, LLC to 1/7/2008. (ch, )
October 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER granting 85 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Suncom Wireless Operating Company LLC is extended to 1/7/08 . Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 10/17/07. (ch, )
October 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Answer Due Deadline Updated for Qwest Wireless, LLC to 1/7/2008. (ch, )
October 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER granting 87 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Qwest Wireless LLC deadline is extended to 1/7/08 . Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 10/17/07. (ch, )
October 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Answer Due Deadline Updated for Dobson Cellular Systems Inc to 1/7/2008. (ch, )
October 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER granting 92 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Dobson Cellular Systems, Inc. deadline is extended to 1/7/08 . Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 10/17/07. (ch, )
October 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Answer Due Deadline Updated for AT & T Mobility, LLC. to 1/7/2008. (ch, )
October 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER granting 86 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. AT & T Mobility deadline is extended to 1/7/08 . Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 10/17/07. (ch, )
October 16, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 101 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Nokia, Inc. identifying Nokia Corporation owns or indirectly owns 10% or more of Nokia, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Williams, Fred)
October 16, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 100 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by LG Electronics, USA, Inc., identifying LG Electronics MobileComm USA, Inc. is a wholly-owned subsidiary of LG Electronics USA, Inc., which is a wholly-owned subsidiary of LG Electronics, Inc. LG Electronics USA, Inc. is owned by LG Electronics, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Williams, Fred)
October 16, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 99 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by MetroPCS, Inc., Metropcs Texas, LLC, MetroPCS Wireless, Inc. identifying MetroPCS, Inc. is wholly owned by MetroPCS Communications, Inc.; MetroPCS Wireless, Inc. is wholly owned by MetroPCS, Inc.; MetroPCS Texas, LLC is wholly owned by MetroPCS Wireless, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Williams, Fred)
October 15, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 98 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Sanyo North America Corporation identifying SANYO Electric Co., Ltd. as Corporate Parent. (Cone, John)
October 15, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 97 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Tracfone Wireless, Inc. identifying America Movil as Corporate Parent. (Williams, Fred)
October 15, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 96 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Sprint Wireless Broadband Company, LLC identifying TDI Acquisition Corporation as Corporate Parent. (Williams, Fred)
October 15, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 95 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc. identifying Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC is wholly owned by Samsung Electronics America, Inc. Samsung Electronics America, Inc. is wholly owned by Samsug Electronics Co., Ltd. as Corporate Parent. (Williams, Fred)
October 15, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 94 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Motorola, Inc. identifying Motorola, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Williams, Fred)
October 15, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 93 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by HELIO LLC identifying SK Telecom USA Holdings, Inc. and EarthLink, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Williams, Fred)
October 15, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 92 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,,,,, [Unopposed] by Dobson Cellular Systems Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
October 15, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 89 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Suncom Wireless Operating Company, LLC identifying SunCom Wireless, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Smith, Melissa)
October 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 91 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Minerva Industries, Inc.. Utstarcom, Inc., served on 9/21/2007, answer due 10/11/2007. (ehs, )
October 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 90 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Minerva Industries, Inc.. HTC Corporation served on 10/1/2007, answer due 10/22/2007. (ehs, )
October 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 88 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Qwest Wireless, LLC identifying Qwest Services Corporation as Corporate Parent. (Smith, Melissa)
October 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 87 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,,,,, Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time for Qwest Wireless, LLC to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Qwest Wireless, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
October 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 86 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,,,,, by AT & T Mobility, LLC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Darby)
October 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 85 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,,,,, Defendant Suncom Wireless Operating Company, LLC's Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond by Suncom Wireless Operating Company, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
October 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 84 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Utstarcom, Inc., identifying None as Corporate Parent. (Smith, Melissa)
October 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 83 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,,,,, Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time for UTStarcom, Inc. to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Utstarcom, Inc.,. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
October 11, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 82 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,,,,, (Unopposed) by Alltel Wireless of Texarkana, LLC, HELIO LLC, Kyocera Wireless Corp., LG Electronics MobileComm USA, Inc., Metropcs Texas, LLC, Nokia Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc., Tracfone Wireless, Inc., Helio, Inc., MetroPCS, Inc., MetroPCS Wireless, Inc., Sprint Wireless Broadband Company, LLC, Virgin Mobil USA, LLC, LG Electronics, USA, Inc.,, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC, Motorola, Inc., Alltel Corporation, Alltel Communications Wireless, Inc., Alltel Communication, Inc., Alltel Communications of Texarkana, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Fred)
October 11, 2007 Opinion or Order Answer Due Deadline Updated for Hewlett-Packard Company to 12/14/2007. (ehs, )
October 11, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER granting 78 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Deadline extended to 12/14/07 for deft Hewlett-Packard Co . Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 10/11/07. (ehs, )
October 11, 2007 Opinion or Order Answer Due Deadline Updated for Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications, (USA), Inc.. (ehs, )
October 11, 2007 Opinion or Order Answer Due Deadline Updated for Sony Ericsson Communications, (USA), Inc. to 11/15/2007. (ehs, )
October 11, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER granting 72 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Deft Sony Ericsson Mobile Comm deadline extended to 11/15/07 . Signed by Judge Donald E. Walter on 10/11/07. (ehs, )
October 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 79 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Warren S Heit for HTC Corporation and HTC America, Inc. (ehs, ) (FEE PAID) 2-1-3101
October 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 78 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Hewlett-Packard Company. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Krevitt, Josh)
October 9, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 77 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Minerva Industries, Inc.. Helio, LLC served on 9/26/2007, answer due 10/16/2007. (ehs, )
October 9, 2007 Opinion or Order Answer Due Deadline Updated for Palm, Inc., to 1/7/2008. (ch, )
October 9, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER granting 68 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Palm, Inc. deadline is extended to 1/7/08 . Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 10/9/07. (ch, )
October 9, 2007 Opinion or Order Answer Due Deadline Updated for Sanyo North America Corporation to 12/3/2007. (ch, )
October 9, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER granting 64 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Sanyo North America Corporation deadline is extended to 12/3/07 . Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 10/9/07. (ch, )
October 9, 2007 Opinion or Order Answer Due Deadline Updated for Pantech Wireless, Inc. to 1/7/2008. (ch, )
October 9, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER granting 67 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Pantech Wireless Inc. deadline is extended to 1/7/08 . Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 10/9/07. (ch, )
October 5, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 73 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Pantech Wireless, Inc. identifying Pantech Co., Ltd. and Pantech & Curitel Communications, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Smith, Melissa)
October 5, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 72 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,,,,, (Unopposed) by Sony Ericsson Communications, (USA), Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Jennifer)
October 4, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 71 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Wayne M Helge for Pantech Wireless, Inc. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 2-1-3082. (ch, )
October 4, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 70 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Hae-Chan Park for Pantech Wireless, Inc. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID)2-1-3082. (ch, )
October 4, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 69 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Paul B Keller for Palm, Inc. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 2-1-3011. (ch, )
October 4, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 68 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,,,,, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial by Palm, Inc.,. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Keller, Paul)
October 4, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 67 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,,,,, Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time for Pantech Wireless, Inc. to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Pantech Wireless, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
October 4, 2007 Opinion or Order Answer Due Deadline Updated for Verizon Communications, Inc. to 11/14/2007; Verizon Wireless Services, LLC to 11/14/2007. (ch, )
October 4, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER granting 61 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Verizon Communication, Inc. and Verizon Wireless Services, LLC deadlines is extended to 11/14/07 . Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 10/4/07. (ch, )
October 4, 2007 Opinion or Order Answer Due Deadline Updated for HTC America, Inc., to 1/7/2008. (ch, )
October 4, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER granting 60 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. HTC America, Inc. deadline is extended to 1/7/08 . Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 10/4/07. (ch, )
October 4, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 64 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Sanyo North America Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cone, John) Additional attachment(s) added on 10/5/2007 (sm, ).
October 4, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 63 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Frederick Bufe on behalf of Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon Wireless Services, LLC (Bufe, John)
October 4, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 62 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Edwin Jones on behalf of Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon Wireless Services, LLC (Jones, Michael)
October 3, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 61 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,,,,, by Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon Wireless Services, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bufe, John)
October 3, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 60 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,,,,, by HTC America, Inc.,. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tindel, Andy)
October 2, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 59 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Minerva Industries, Inc.. Tracfone Wireless, Inc. served on 9/25/2007, answer due 10/15/2007. (ehs, )
October 2, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 58 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Minerva Industries, Inc.. Motorola, Inc. served by Process Server on 9/25/2007, answer due 10/15/2007. (ch, )
October 2, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 57 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Minerva Industries, Inc.. Hewlett-Packard Company served on 9/25/2007, answer due 10/15/2007. (ehs, )
October 2, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 56 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Minerva Industries, Inc.. LG Electronics Mobilecomm USA., Inc., served by Process Server on 9/25/2007, answer due 10/15/2007. (ch, )
October 2, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 55 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Minerva Industries, Inc.. Samsung Electronics America, Inc. served on 9/25/2007, answer due 10/15/2007. (ehs, )
October 2, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 54 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Minerva Industries, Inc.. Dobson Cellular Systems Inc served by Process Server on 9/25/2007, answer due 10/15/2007. (ch, )
October 2, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 53 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Minerva Industries, Inc.. Alltel Wireless of Texarkana, LLC. served Process Server on 9/25/2007, answer due 10/15/2007. (ch, )
October 2, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 52 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Minerva Industries, Inc.. Qwest Wireless, LLC served on 9/25/2007, answer due 10/15/2007. (ehs, )
October 2, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 51 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Minerva Industries, Inc.. Alltel Communications Wireless, Inc. served by Process Server on 9/25/2007, answer due 10/15/2007. (ch, )
October 2, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 50 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Minerva Industries, Inc.. Virgin Mobil USA, LLC served on 9/25/2007, answer due 10/15/2007. (ehs, )
October 2, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 49 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Minerva Industries, Inc.. Alltel Communication, Inc. served by Process Server on 9/25/2007, answer due 10/15/2007. (ch, )
October 2, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 48 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Minerva Industries, Inc.. Alltel Communications of Texarkana, Inc. served by Process Server on 9/25/2007, answer due 10/15/2007. (ch, )
October 2, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 47 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Minerva Industries, Inc.. Alltel Corporation served by Process Server on 9/21/07, answer due 10/11/2007. (ch, )
October 2, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 46 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Minerva Industries, Inc.. Nokia Mobile Phones, Inc. served by Process Server on 9/24/2007, answer due 10/15/2007. (ch, )
October 2, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 45 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Minerva Industries, Inc.. Nokia, Inc. served by Process Server on 9/24/2007, answer due 10/15/2007. (ch, )
October 1, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 44 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Minerva Industries, Inc.. Kyocera Wireless Corporation served on 9/25/2007, answer due 10/15/2007. (ehs, )
October 1, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 43 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Minerva Industries, Inc.. Helio, Inc. served on 9/25/2007, answer due 10/15/2007. (ehs, )
October 1, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 42 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Minerva Industries, Inc.. Kyocera America, Inc. served by Process Server on 9/25/2007, answer due 10/15/2007. (ch, )
October 1, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 41 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Minerva Industries, Inc.. Verizon Communications, Inc. served on 9/25/2007, answer due 10/15/2007. (ehs, )
October 1, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 40 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Minerva Industries, Inc.. Samsung America, Inc. served by Process Server on 9/25/2007, answer due 10/15/2007. (ch, )
October 1, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 39 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Minerva Industries, Inc.. U.S. Cellular Wireless served on 9/25/2007, answer due 10/15/2007. (ehs, )
October 1, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 38 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Minerva Industries, Inc.. T-Mobile USA served on 9/25/2007, answer due 10/15/2007. (ehs, )
October 1, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 37 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Minerva Industries, Inc.. Sprint Wireless Broadband Company, LLC served on 9/25/2007, answer due 10/15/2007. (ehs, )
October 1, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 36 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Minerva Industries, Inc.. MetroPCS, Inc. served by Process Server on 10/1/2007, answer due 10/22/2007. (ch, )
October 1, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 35 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Minerva Industries, Inc.. Suncom Wireless Operating Company, LLC served by Process Server on 9/25/2007, answer due 10/15/2007. (ch, )
October 1, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 34 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Minerva Industries, Inc.. Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC served by Process Server on 9/25/2007, answer due 10/15/2007. (ch, )
October 1, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 33 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Minerva Industries, Inc.. MetroPCS Wireless, Inc. served by Process Server on 9/25/2007, answer due 10/15/2007. (ch, )
October 1, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 32 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Minerva Industries, Inc.. Samsung TeleCommunications America, Inc. served on 9/25/2007, answer due 10/15/2007. (ehs, )
October 1, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 31 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Minerva Industries, Inc.. Metropcs Texas, LLC served by Process Server on 9/25/2007, answer due 10/15/2007. (ch, )
October 1, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 30 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Minerva Industries, Inc.. AT & T Mobility, LLC. served on 9/25/2007, answer due 10/15/2007. (ehs, )
October 1, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 29 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Minerva Industries, Inc.. LG Electronics, USA, Inc., served by Process Server on 9/25/2007, answer due 10/15/2007. (ch, )
September 24, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 28 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Minerva Industries, Inc.. Sony Ericsson Communications, (USA), Inc. served by Private Investigator on 9/20/2007, answer due 10/10/2007. (ch, )
September 24, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 27 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Minerva Industries, Inc.. Palm, Inc., served by Process Server on 9/14/2007, answer due 10/4/2007. (ch, )
September 24, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 26 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Minerva Industries, Inc.. HTC America, Inc., served by Process Server on 9/14/2007, answer due 10/4/2007. (ch, )
September 24, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 25 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Minerva Industries, Inc.. Pantech Wireless, Inc. served by Process Server on 9/14/2007, answer due 10/4/2007. (ch, )
September 24, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 24 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Minerva Industries, Inc.. Sanyo North America Corporation served by Process Server on 9/14/2007, answer due 10/4/2007. (ch, )
September 24, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 23 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Hewlett-Packard Company. (ch, )
September 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 21 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to T-Mobile USA, Tracfone Wireless, Inc., U.S. Cellular Wireless, Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon Wireless Services, LLC, Virgin Mobil USA, LLC, Utstarcom, Inc.,. (ch, )
September 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 20 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Southernlinc Wireless, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Wireless Broadband Company, LLC, Suncom Wireless Operating Company, LLC, Sony Ericsson Communications, (USA), Inc.. (ch, )
September 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 19 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Qwest Wireless, LLC, Samsung America, Inc., Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC, Samsung TeleCommunications America, Inc.. (ch, )
September 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 18 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Metropcs Texas, LLC, Kyocera Wireless Corporation, Kyocera America, Inc., LG Electronics, USA, Inc.,, LG Electronics Mobilecomm USA., Inc.,. (ch, )
September 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 17 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to AT & T Mobility, LLC., Boost Mobile, Dobson Cellular Systems Inc, Helio, Inc., Helio, LLC. (ch, )
September 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 16 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Alltel Communication, Inc., Alltel Wireless of Texarkana, LLC., Alltel Corporation, Alltel Communications Wireless, Inc., Alltel Communications of Texarkana, Inc.. (ch, )
September 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 15 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to MetroPCS, Inc., MetroPCS Wireless, Inc., Motorola, Inc., Nokia, Inc., Nokia Mobile Phones, Inc.. (ch, )
September 13, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 22 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to HTC Corporation, HTC America, Inc.,, Palm, Inc.,, Pantech Wireless, Inc., Sanyo North America Corporation. (ch, )
June 13, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 14 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Robert E Satterthwaite for Minerva Industries, Inc. (FEE PAID) 6-1-10055 (ehs, )
June 13, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 13 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney David R Gabor for Minerva Industries, Inc. (FEE PAID) 6-1-10055 (ehs, )
June 13, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 12 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Larry C Russ for Minerva Industries, Inc. (FEE PAID) 6-1-10055 (ehs, )
June 13, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 11 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Irene Y Lee for Minerva Industries, Inc. (FEE PAID) 6-1-10055 (ehs, )
June 13, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 10 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Marc A Fenster for Minerva Industries, Inc. (FEE PAID) 6-1-10055 (ehs, )
June 8, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrew Wesley Spangler on behalf of Minerva Industries, Inc. (Spangler, Andrew)
June 8, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sidney Calvin Capshaw, III on behalf of Minerva Industries, Inc. (Capshaw, Sidney)
June 8, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Elizabeth L DeRieux on behalf of Minerva Industries, Inc. (DeRieux, Elizabeth)
June 8, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE by Minerva Industries, Inc. (Notice of Related Case) (DeRieux, Elizabeth)
June 7, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Minerva Industries, Inc. identifying None as Corporate Parent. (Maloney, Collin)
June 7, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Franklin Jones, Jr on behalf of Minerva Industries, Inc. (Jones, Franklin)
June 6, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing fee: $ 350.00, receipt number 2-1-2635 (ch, )
June 6, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Otis W Carroll, Jr on behalf of Minerva Industries, Inc. (Carroll, Otis)
June 6, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Form mailed to Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks. (ch, )
June 6, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 1 ORIGINAL COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Alltel Wireless of Texarkana, LLC., AT & T Mobility, LLC., Boost Mobile, Dobson Cellular Systems Inc, Helio, Inc., Helio, LLC, Hewlett-Packard Company, MetroPCS, Inc., Metropcs Texas, LLC, MetroPCS Wireless, Inc., Qwest Wireless, LLC, Southernlinc Wireless, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Wireless Broadband Company, LLC, Suncom Wireless Operating Company, LLC, T-Mobile USA, Tracfone Wireless, Inc., U.S. Cellular Wireless, Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon Wireless Services, LLC, Virgin Mobil USA, LLC, HTC Corporation, HTC America, Inc.,, Kyocera Wireless Corporation, Kyocera America, Inc., LG Electronics, USA, Inc.,, LG Electronics Mobilecomm USA., Inc.,, Palm, Inc.,, Pantech Wireless, Inc., Sanyo North America Corporation, Utstarcom, Inc.,, Sony Ericsson Communications, (USA), Inc., Samsung America, Inc., Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC, Samsung TeleCommunications America, Inc., Motorola, Inc., Nokia, Inc., Nokia Mobile Phones, Inc., Alltel Corporation, Alltel Communications Wireless, Inc., Alltel Communications of Texarkana, Inc. (Filing fee $ 350.) , filed by Minerva Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ch, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Minerva Industries, Inc. v. Motorola, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Minerva Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Fred Irvin Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Motorola, Inc.
Represented By: Steven M Zager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nokia, Inc.
Represented By: Carl R Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT & T Mobility, LLC.
Represented By: Fred Irvin Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dobson Cellular Systems Inc
Represented By: Fred Irvin Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Helio, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hewlett-Packard Company
Represented By: John L LaBarre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MetroPCS Wireless, Inc.
Represented By: Steven M Zager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southernlinc Wireless
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T-Mobile USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracfone Wireless, Inc.
Represented By: Todd Eric Landis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Cellular Wireless
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virgin Mobil USA, LLC
Represented By: Steven M Zager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HTC America, Inc.,
Represented By: Steven M Zager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kyocera Wireless Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kyocera America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Electronics Mobilecomm USA., Inc.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Palm, Inc.,
Represented By: Scott English Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pantech Wireless, Inc.
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanyo North America Corporation
Represented By: Rachel M Vorbeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Utstarcom, Inc.,
Represented By: Alison M Tucher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sony Ericsson Communications, (USA), Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer Parker Ainsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung America, Inc.
Represented By: Frank C Cimino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alltel Communication, Inc.
Represented By: Fred Irvin Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HELIO LLC
Represented By: Steven M Zager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kyocera Wireless Corp.
Represented By: Steven M Zager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Electronics MobileComm USA, Inc.
Represented By: Steven M Zager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nokia Inc.
Represented By: Steven M Zager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T-Mobile USA, Inc.
Represented By: Steven M Zager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alltel Communications, Inc.
Represented By: Fred Irvin Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virgin Mobile USA, LP
Represented By: Fred Irvin Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: High Tech Computer Corp.
Represented By: Steven M Zager
Search News [