Wolf v. Brightroom, Inc. et al Featured Case

Plaintiff alleged that defendants Brightroom, Inc., Island Photography, Inc., Elizabeth M. Kreutz, Bird\'s Eye View, Inc., Digilabs, Inc., Printroom, INc., Smugmug, Inc. and Hour Photos, Inc. d/b/a Master Photos U.S.A. infringed on U.S Patent No. 7,047,214 entitled \"Process for Providing Event Photographs for Inspection, Selection and Distribution Via a Computer Network.\"

Plaintiff: Peter H. Wolf
Defendant: Hour Photos, Inc., Gregory Walter, SmugMug, Inc., Bird's Eye View, Inc., Brightroom, Inc., Island Photography, Inc. and Elizabeth M. Kreutz
Case Number: 2:2007cv00238
Filed: June 8, 2007
Court: Texas Eastern District Court
Office: Marshall Office
County: Anderson
Presiding Judge: David Folsom
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 13, 2008 79 Featured Case ORDER; It is ORDERED that this action is hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Any pending motions not expressly granted are hereby DENIED. Gregory Walter terminated.,. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 5/13/08. (mrm, )
May 12, 2008 78 Featured Case ORDER - granting 77 Stipulation of Dismissal. Brightroom, Inc. are hereby dismissed with prejudice, all attorney fees, costs are to be borne by the party incurred them. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 5/12/08. (ch, )
May 9, 2008 77 STIPULATION of Dismissal Brightroom, Inc. by Peter H. Wolf. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goldstein, Edward)
April 9, 2008 76 Featured Case PROPOSED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER - Claims Construction Hearing set for 11/13/2008 09:00 AM before Judge David Folsom.,Proposed Pretrial Order due by 9/7/2009., Jury Selection set for 10/6/2009 09:00AM before Judge David Folsom. All other deadlines are set forth herein. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 4/9/08. (ch, )
April 4, 2008 75 MOTION to Amend/Correct Unopposed Motion to Revise Docket Control Order by Brightroom, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stevens, Scott)
March 24, 2008 74 Featured Case PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 3/24/08. (ch, )
March 24, 2008 73 Featured Case DOCKET CONTROL ORDER - Claim Construction Hearing set for 11/13/2008 09:00 AM before Judge David Folsom., Daubert Motions due by 7/8/2009., Proposed Pretrial Order due by 9/7/2009., Jury Selection set for 10/6/2009 before Judge David Folsom., Pretrial Conference set for 10/5/2009 before Judge David Folsom.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 3/24/08. (ch, )
March 13, 2008 72 MOTION for Protective Order : Unopposed Motion for Entry of Protective Order by Peter H. Wolf. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goldstein, Edward)
March 13, 2008 71 MOTION Unopposed Motion for Entry of Docket Control Order by Peter H. Wolf. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goldstein, Edward) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/14/2008 (sm, ).
March 5, 2008 70 NOTICE of Disclosure by Brightroom, Inc. (Stevens, Scott)
February 19, 2008 69 Featured Case ORDER to implement procedures applying to future motions to be submitted in recently filed cases. This procedure is necessary to allow the Court tomanage its docket in a timely fashion. The procedures are set forth herein. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 2/19/08. (ehs, )
February 19, 2008 68 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge David Folsom : Scheduling Conference held on 2/19/2008. (Court Reporter Libby Crawford.) (mrm, )
February 15, 2008 67 Featured Case ORDER - granting 65 Stipulation of Dismissal. Dft Island Photography, Inc. is hereby dismissed with prejudice. All attorney fees and costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 2/15/08. (ch, )
February 15, 2008 66 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Docket Control Oder)(Goldstein, Edward)
February 14, 2008 65 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Defendant Island Photography, Inc. by Peter H. Wolf. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Stipulation of Dismissal)(Goldstein, Edward)
February 11, 2008 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Island Photography, Inc. to 2/15/2008. (ch, )
February 11, 2008 64 Featured Case ORDER granting 63 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Dft. Island Photography, Inc. deadline is extended to 2/15/08. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 2/11/08. (ch, )
February 8, 2008 63 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, To Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond by Island Photography, Inc.. (Gardner, Allen) Additional attachment(s) added on 2/11/2008 (sm, ).
January 24, 2008 62 Plaintiff's ANSWER to Counterclaim of Brightroom, Inc. by Peter H. Wolf.(Goldstein, Edward)
January 24, 2008 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Island Photography, Inc. to 2/8/2008. (sm, )
January 24, 2008 61 Featured Case ORDER granting 60 Motion for Extension of Time for Dft Island Photography to File an answer to complaint up to and including February 8, 2008.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 1/22/2008. (sm, )
January 22, 2008 ***FILED IN ERROR, PER ATTY, ATTY HAS REFILED, SEE #60, #59 HAS BEEN TERMINATED***. Document # 59, Consent Motion. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (sm, )
January 18, 2008 60 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Island Photography, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gardner, Allen)
January 18, 2008 59 ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE.***Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Island Photography, Inc.. (Gardner, Allen) Modified on 1/22/2008 (sm, ).
January 16, 2008 58 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Michael G Kelber for Brightroom, Inc. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 2-1-3406. (ch, )
January 7, 2008 57 Featured Case NOTICE OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, PROPOSED DEADLINES FOR DOCKET CONTROL ORDER, AND DISCOVERY ORDER; Scheduling Conference set for 2/19/2008 10:30 AM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before Judge David Folsom.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 1/7/08. (mrm, )
January 4, 2008 56 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Brightroom, Inc. identifying None as Corporate Parent. (Stevens, Scott)
January 4, 2008 55 Brightroom, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand Brightroom, Inc.'s, COUNTERCLAIM against Peter H. Wolf by Brightroom, Inc..(Stevens, Scott)
January 3, 2008 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Island Photography, Inc. to 1/18/2008. (mrm, )
January 3, 2008 54 Featured Case ORDER granting 53 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer It is therefore ORDERED that Defendant Island Photography, Inc. has up to and including January 18, 2008 to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 1/3/08. (mrm, )
December 28, 2007 53 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by Island Photography, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gardner, Allen)
December 17, 2007 52 Featured Case ORDER pursuant to the Stipulation of Dismissal filed, deft Elizabeth M Kreutz is dismissed from this case. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 12/17/07. (ehs, )
December 17, 2007 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Brightroom, Inc. to 1/4/2008. (ch, )
December 17, 2007 51 Featured Case ORDER granting 49 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Brightroom, Inc. deadline to answer is extended to 1/4/08. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 12/17/07. (ch, )
December 14, 2007 50 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Defendant Elizabeth M. Kreutz by Peter H. Wolf. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Stipulation of Dismissal)(Goldstein, Edward)
December 13, 2007 49 Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer for Brightroom, Inc. to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Peter H. Wolf. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint)(Goldstein, Edward)
December 12, 2007 48 Featured Case ORDER - granting 47 Stipulation of Dismissal. Bird's Eye View, Inc. is hereby dismissed. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 12/12/07. (ch, )
December 11, 2007 47 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Defendant Bird's Eye View, Inc. by Peter H. Wolf. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Stipulation of Dismissal as to Defendant Bird's Eye View, Inc.)(Goldstein, Edward)
November 29, 2007 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Bird's Eye View, Inc. to 12/11/2007. (mrm, )
November 29, 2007 Featured Case ORDER granting 44 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Bird's Eye View, Inc. has up to and including December 11, 2007, to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 11/29/07. (mrm, )
November 29, 2007 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Island Photography, Inc. to 12/28/2007. (mrm, )
November 29, 2007 46 Featured Case ORDER granting 45 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Island Photography, Inc. has up to and including December 28, 2007 to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 11/29/07. (mrm, )
November 29, 2007 NOTICE re 45 Counter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint. Edited by clerk to change docket text to read Consent Motion instead of Counter Motion, per attorney. (mpv, )
November 28, 2007 45 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by Island Photography, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gardner, Allen) Modified on 11/29/2007 (mpv, ).
November 28, 2007 44 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, for Bird's Eye View, Inc. by Peter H. Wolf. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goldstein, Edward)
November 26, 2007 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Brightroom, Inc. to 12/14/2007. (mrm, )
November 26, 2007 43 Featured Case ORDER granting 42 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Defendant Brightroom, Inc. has up to and including December 14, 2007, to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 11/26/07. (mrm, )
November 21, 2007 42 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, for Brightroom, Inc. by Peter H. Wolf. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goldstein, Edward)
November 20, 2007 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Bird's Eye View, Inc. to 11/27/2007. (mrm, )
November 20, 2007 41 Featured Case ORDER granting 40 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Defendant Bird's Eye View, Inc. has up to and including November 27, 2007, to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 11/20/07. (mrm, )
November 19, 2007 40 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, for Birds Eye View by Peter H. Wolf. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goldstein, Edward)
November 9, 2007 39 Featured Case ORDER re 38 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Peter H. Wolf,, SmugMug, Inc. terminated.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 11/9/07. (mrm, )
November 8, 2007 38 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Defendant SmugMug, Inc. by Peter H. Wolf. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Stipulation of Dismissal as to Defendant SmugMug, Inc.)(Goldstein, Edward)
November 6, 2007 37 Featured Case ORDER re 36 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Peter H. Wolf,, Hour Photos, Inc. terminated.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 11/6/07. (mrm, )
November 1, 2007 36 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Defendant Hour Photos, Inc. by Peter H. Wolf. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Stipulation of Dismissal as to Defendant Hour Photos, Inc.)(Goldstein, Edward)
October 30, 2007 35 Featured Case ORDER granting 33 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Island Photography, Inc. has up to and including November 28, 2007 to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 10/30/07. (mrm, )
October 30, 2007 Answer Due Deadline Updated for SmugMug, Inc. to 11/8/2007. (mrm, )
October 30, 2007 34 Featured Case ORDER granting 32 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; SmugMug, Inc. has up to and including November 8, 2007, to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. . Signed by Judge David Folsom on 10/30/07. (mrm, )
October 29, 2007 33 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by Island Photography, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gardner, Allen)
October 29, 2007 32 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, for SmugMug, Inc. to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Peter H. Wolf. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion for Extension)(Goldstein, Edward)
October 23, 2007 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Brightroom, Inc. to 11/27/2007. (sm, )
October 23, 2007 31 Featured Case ORDER granting 29 Motion for Extension of Time for Dft Brightroom to Answer Complaint up to and including November 27, 2007 . Signed by Judge David Folsom on 10/23/2007. (sm, )
October 22, 2007 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Bird's Eye View, Inc. to 11/19/2007. (sm, )
October 22, 2007 30 Featured Case ORDER granting 28 Motion for Extension of Time for Dft Birds Eye View to Answer Complaint up to and including November 19, 2007. . Signed by Judge David Folsom on 10/22/2007. (sm, )
October 22, 2007 29 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, for Brightroom, Inc. to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Peter H. Wolf. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Order for Extension)(Goldstein, Edward)
October 18, 2007 28 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, for Bird's Eye View, Inc. to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Peter H. Wolf. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Bird's Eye View, Inc. to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint)(Goldstein, Edward)
October 16, 2007 27 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Michael J Collins for Peter H. Wolf. (FEE PAID) 2-1-3114 (ehs, )
October 9, 2007 26 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Peter H. Wolf. Bird's Eye View, Inc. served CMRR on 10/1/2007, answer due 10/22/2007. (ch, )
October 4, 2007 25 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Peter H. Wolf. Brightroom, Inc. served Fedex on 10/1/2007, answer due 10/22/2007. (ch, )
October 2, 2007 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Island Photography, Inc. to 10/29/2007. (sm, )
October 2, 2007 24 Featured Case ORDER granting 23 Motion for Extension of Time for Dft Island Photgraphy, Inc. to Answer to Complaint up to and including October 29, 2007. . Signed by Judge David Folsom on 10/2/2007. (sm, )
September 26, 2007 23 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Island Photography, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gardner, Allen)
September 24, 2007 Answer Due Deadline Updated for SmugMug, Inc. to 10/29/2007. (sm, )
September 24, 2007 22 Featured Case ORDER granting 21 Motion for Extension of Time for Dft SmugMug, Inc. to Answer Complaint up to and including October 29, 2007. . Signed by Judge David Folsom on 9/20/2007. (sm, )
September 19, 2007 21 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by SmugMug, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeVasto, Diane)
September 10, 2007 20 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Peter H. Wolf. Elizabeth M. Kreutz served CMRR on 8/30/2007, answer due 9/19/2007. (ch, ) Modified on 9/11/2007 (ch, ).
September 7, 2007 19 Featured Case ORDER re: 18 Stipulation of Dismissal, DigiLabs, Inc. terminated.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 9/7/07. (mrm, )
September 6, 2007 18 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Defendant DigiLabs ONLY by Peter H. Wolf. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goldstein, Edward)
August 31, 2007 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Island Photography, Inc. to 9/28/2007. (mrm, )
August 31, 2007 17 Featured Case ORDER granting 14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Island Photography Inc's Answer due 9/28/07 . Signed by Judge David Folsom on 8/31/07. (mrm, )
August 31, 2007 16 ANSWER to Complaint by Hour Photos, Inc. d/b/a Master Photo USA pro se, Gregory Walter, President of Hour Photos, Inc.(ehs, )
August 30, 2007 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Edwin Jones on behalf of SmugMug, Inc., Island Photography, Inc. (Jones, Michael)
August 27, 2007 14 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, Move, or Otherwise Respond by Island Photography, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeVasto, Diane)
August 23, 2007 Answer Due Deadline Updated for SmugMug, Inc. to 9/27/2007. (mrm, )
August 23, 2007 13 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT SMUGMUG, INC.'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME IN WHICH TO ANSWER, MOVE, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT; granting 12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; SmugMug answer due 9/27/07 . Signed by Judge David Folsom on 8/23/07. (mrm, )
August 22, 2007 12 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, Move, or Otherwise Respond by SmugMug, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeVasto, Diane)
August 17, 2007 11 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Peter H. Wolf. Hour Photos, Inc. served by CMRR on 8/13/2007, answer due 9/4/2007. (ch, )
August 15, 2007 10 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Peter H. Wolf. SmugMug, Inc. served by CMRR on 8/8/2007, answer due 8/28/2007. (ch, )
August 15, 2007 9 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Peter H. Wolf. Island Photography, Inc. served by CMRR on 8/9/2007, answer due 8/29/2007. (ch, )
August 15, 2007 8 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Peter H. Wolf. DigiLabs, Inc. served by CMRR on 8/9/2007, answer due 8/29/2007. (ch, )
August 13, 2007 7 Featured Case ORDER granting 6 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Peter H. Wolf, as to Printroom Inc . Signed by Judge David Folsom on August 13, 2007. (rml, )
August 9, 2007 6 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Defendant Printroom, Inc. only by Peter H. Wolf. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goldstein, Edward)
August 8, 2007 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew Prebeg on behalf of Peter H. Wolf (Prebeg, Matthew)
August 8, 2007 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Edward W Goldstein on behalf of Peter H. Wolf (Goldstein, Edward)
June 15, 2007 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric M. Albritton on behalf of Peter H. Wolf (Albritton, Eric)
June 11, 2007 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Smugmug, Inc., Hour Photos, Inc., Brightroom, Inc., Island Photography, Inc., Elizabeth M. Kreutz, Bird's Eye View, Inc., Digilabs, Inc., Printroom, Inc.. (ehs, )
June 8, 2007 2 NOTICE by Peter H. Wolf of Filing Form A0120 (Attachments: # 1 Form A0120)(Goldstein, Edward)
June 8, 2007 1 COMPLAINT against all defendants ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 1153177.), filed by Peter H. Wolf. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Original Complaint# 2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet# 3 Supplement List of Parties)(Prebeg, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wolf v. Brightroom, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hour Photos, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Walter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SmugMug, Inc.
Represented By: Diane DeVasto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bird's Eye View, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brightroom, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Island Photography, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Edwin Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth M. Kreutz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter H. Wolf
Represented By: Thomas John Ward, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?