May 3, 2012 |
Filing 373
NOTICE by FotoMedia Technologies, LLC NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR TERMINATION OF ELECTRONIC NOTICES (Baxter, Samuel)
|
October 8, 2009 |
Filing 372
ORDER granting #371 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Gary Scott Kitchen terminated as counsel for Pltf. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 10/8/09. (ehs, )
|
October 7, 2009 |
Filing 371
Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by FotoMedia Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kitchen, Gary)
|
October 1, 2009 |
Filing 370
ORDER granting #368 Motion to Dismiss. All claims asserted between plaintiff and Dft Yahoo! Inc. are hereby dismissed with prejudice. All attorney fees are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 10/1/09. (ch, )
|
October 1, 2009 |
Filing 369
ORDER granting #367 Motion to Dismiss Photobucket.com, Inc., in this case with prejudice, all attorneys' fees and costs are to be borne by the party thatincurred them. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 10/1/09. (ehs, )
|
September 22, 2009 |
Filing 368
Joint MOTION to Dismiss as between Yahoo! Inc. and FotoMedia Technologies LLC by FotoMedia Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
|
September 22, 2009 |
Filing 367
Joint MOTION to Dismiss by FotoMedia Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
|
September 17, 2009 |
Filing 366
ORDER granting #365 Motion for Extension of Time to File their Stipulation of Dismissal. The deadline for the Parties to file their Stipulation ofDismissal be extended seven business days, up to and including September 22, 2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 9/17/09. (ehs, )
|
September 15, 2009 |
Filing 365
Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File THE STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL by FotoMedia Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
|
September 15, 2009 |
Filing 364
ORDER re #363 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by AOL, LLC., FotoMedia Technologies, LLC. Entry of Order to Dismiss with Prejudice deft AOL. in accordance with a Patent License and Settlement Agreement that resolves all claims between FotoMedia and AOL in the above-captioned action, all claims asserted or that could have been asserted between FotoMedia and AOL in this action with regard to the patents-in-suit, U.S. Patent No. 6,018,774, U.S. Patent No. 6,542,936, and U.S. Patent No. 6,871,231, as well as any and all United States patents and foreign counterpart patents existing or subsequently issuing from any application claiming priority, in whole or in part, to any of the foregoing or to any patents to which the foregoing patents claim priority, and any and all patents existing or subsequently issuing from continuations, divisionals, continuations-in-part, reexaminations, reissues, extensions, and renewals of any of the foregoing, are hereby dismissed with prejudice.It is further ORDERED that each party will bear its own attorneys fees, expenses, and costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 8/15/09. (ehs, )
|
September 12, 2009 |
Filing 363
STIPULATION of Dismissal WITH PREJUDICE by FotoMedia Technologies, LLC, AOL, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
|
September 8, 2009 |
Filing 362
ORDER granting #360 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Deadline for FotoMedia and Yahoo! to file their Stipulation of Dismissal in this action pursuant to Rule 41 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure be extended ten business days, up to and including 9/15/09. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 9/8/09. (ch, )
|
September 8, 2009 |
Filing 361
ORDER granting #359 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Deadline for parties to file their Stipulation of Dismissal is extended to 9/15/09. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 9/8/09. (ch, )
|
September 4, 2009 |
Filing 360
Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Stipulation of Dismissal between FotoMedia and Yahoo! by FotoMedia Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
|
September 4, 2009 |
Filing 359
Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Stipulation of Dismissal between FotoMedia and Photobucket.com by FotoMedia Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
|
September 1, 2009 |
Filing 358
ORDER granting #355 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Deadline for the Parties to file their Stipulation of Dismissal be extended four days, up to and including 9/4/09. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 9/1/09. (ch, )
|
September 1, 2009 |
Filing 357
ORDER granting #356 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Deadline for FotoMedia and Yahoo! to file their Stipulation of Dismissal in this action pursuant to Rule 41 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure be extended four days, up to and including 9/4/09. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 9/1/09. (ch, )
|
August 31, 2009 |
Filing 356
Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Stipulation of Dismissal as between FotoMedia and Yahoo! by FotoMedia Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
|
August 31, 2009 |
Filing 355
Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Stipulation of Dismissal as between FotoMedia and Photobucket.com by FotoMedia Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
|
August 20, 2009 |
Filing 354
ORDER granting #353 Motion to Dismiss. All claims asserted between plaintiff and dft Shutterfly Inc. are hereby dismissed with prejudice. Each party shall bear its own cost and attorney fees. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 8/20/09. (ch, )
|
August 19, 2009 |
Filing 353
Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss BETWEEN FOTOMEDIA TECHNOLOGIES LLC AND SHUTTERFLY, INC. by FotoMedia Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
|
August 18, 2009 |
Filing 352
REPORT of Mediation by Harlan A Martin. Mediation result: Settled (Photobucket.com, Inc.)(ch, )
|
August 18, 2009 |
Filing 351
REPORT of Mediation by Harlan A Martin. Mediation result: Settled (AOL, LLC)(ch, ) Modified on 8/19/2009 (ch, ).
|
August 13, 2009 |
Filing 350
ORDER granting #349 Motion to Stay Deadlines between FotoMedia and AOL pending settlement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on August 13, 2009. (jml)
|
August 12, 2009 |
Filing 349
Joint MOTION to Stay Deadlines and Notice of Settlement as between AOL and FotoMedia by FotoMedia Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
|
August 12, 2009 |
Filing 348
ORDER granting #344 Motion to Dismiss. Claims and counterclaims against FotoMedia and CBSI/CNET are hereby dismissed with prejudice. Each party shall bear its own attorney fees, expenses and costs. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 8/12/09. (ch, )
|
August 12, 2009 |
Filing 347
ORDER granting #252 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on August 12, 2009. (jml)
|
August 12, 2009 |
Filing 346
ORDER granting #343 Motion to Stay as to deadlines between Fotomedia and Yahoo. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on August 12, 2009. (jml)
|
August 12, 2009 |
Filing 345
ORDER re #223 Unopposed SEALED MOTION for Leave to Amend Answer, Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims to Amended Complaint and Motion Under Rule 19 and Rule 20 of the F.R.C.P. to Add Flashpoint Technology Inc. and Scenera Research LLC as Parties to Amended Comp filed by Photobucket.com, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on August 12, 2009. (jml)
|
August 11, 2009 |
Filing 344
Agreed MOTION to Dismiss AGREED MOTION FOR APPROVAL AND ENTRY OF STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL by FotoMedia Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
|
August 11, 2009 |
Filing 343
Joint MOTION to Stay DEADLINES AND NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT BETWEEN FOTOMEDIA AND YAHOO!, INC. by FotoMedia Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
|
August 11, 2009 |
Filing 342
ORDER granting #255 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on August 11, 2009. (jml)
|
August 11, 2009 |
Filing 341
ORDER denying as moot Docket Nos. 293, 300, 310, 335, 336 and 338 pursuant to notification by the paties of settlement between Photobucket.com Inc. and Fotomedia Technologies, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on August 11, 2009. (jml)
|
August 11, 2009 |
Filing 340
ORDER granting #339 Motion to Stay as to all case deadlines and discovery relating to and between FotoMedia and Photobucket. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on August 11, 2009.(jml)
|
August 10, 2009 |
Filing 339
Joint MOTION to Stay Deadlines and Notice of Settlement between FotoMedia and Photobucket.com Inc. by FotoMedia Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
|
August 10, 2009 |
Filing 338
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #300 SEALED MOTION Photobucket.com, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Production of Documents Related to the Prosecution of the Patents-In-Suit and Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof by FotoMedia Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
|
August 7, 2009 |
Filing 337
SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #293 MOTION to Stay MOTION to Sever Photobucket.com Inc.'s Walker Process Counterclaim filed by Photobucket.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Gabriel M. Ramsey, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5)(Ramsey, Gabriel)
|
August 7, 2009 |
Filing 336
Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Documents by Photobucket.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ramsey, Gabriel)
|
August 7, 2009 |
Filing 335
Fourth MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Photobucket's Motion to Compel Documents Related to the Prosecution of the Patents in Suit by FotoMedia Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
|
August 5, 2009 |
Filing 334
ORDER granting #329 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #300 SEALED MOTION Photobucket.com, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Production of Documents Related to the Prosecution of the Patents-In-Suit and Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof Responses due by 8/7/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 8/5/09. (ch, )
|
August 4, 2009 |
Filing 333
MOTION for Reconsideration re #322 Memorandum & Opinion by FotoMedia Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Manley, Robert)
|
August 4, 2009 |
Filing 332
MOTION for Reconsideration re #322 Memorandum & Opinion Partial Reconsideration by Yahoo!Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Partridge, Scott)
|
August 3, 2009 |
Filing 331
RESPONSE to #311 Sealed Document PLAINTIFF'S REPLY TO PHOTOBUCKET.COM INC.'S SECOND AMENDED COUNTERCLAIMS by FotoMedia Technologies, LLC. (Manley, Robert)
|
July 31, 2009 |
Filing 330
ORDER granting #323 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Photobuckets Motion to Compel Documents Related to the Prosecution of the Patents in Suit. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/31/09. (ehs, )
|
July 31, 2009 |
Filing 329
Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #300 SEALED MOTION Photobucket.com, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Production of Documents Related to the Prosecution of the Patents-In-Suit and Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof by FotoMedia Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
|
July 31, 2009 |
Filing 328
ORDER granting #327 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response in opposition to #293 MOTION to Stay MOTION to Sever. Responses due by 8/7/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/31/09. (ehs, )
|
July 30, 2009 |
Filing 327
***REPLACES # 326 ***Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #293 MOTION to Stay MOTION to Sever Photobucket.com Inc.'s Walker Process Counterclaim Photobucket's CORRECTED Unopposed Motion for a Third Extension of Time to File Its Opposition to Fotomedia's Motion to Sever and Stay by Photobucket.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Greer, Yvonne) Modified on 7/30/2009 (ch, ).
|
July 30, 2009 |
Filing 326
***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY. PLEASE IGNORE.***Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #293 MOTION to Stay MOTION to Sever Photobucket.com Inc.'s Walker Process Counterclaim Photobucket's Unopposed Motion for a Third Extension of Time to File Its Opposition to Fotomedia's Motion to Sever and Stay by Photobucket.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Greer, Yvonne) Modified on 7/30/2009 (ch, ).
|
July 30, 2009 |
Filing 325
ORDER Granting Joint Motion to Amend Docket Control Order - Discovery due by 9/25/2009. Expert Witness List due by 8/28/2009. Motions due by 8/24/2009.), Motions terminated: #324 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order filed by Yahoo!Inc... Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/30/09. (ehs, )
|
July 30, 2009 |
***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY Document # 326, Unopposed Motion for Third Extension to time. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
|
July 29, 2009 |
Filing 324
Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order by Yahoo!Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Partridge, Scott)
|
July 28, 2009 |
Filing 323
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #300 SEALED MOTION Photobucket.com, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Production of Documents Related to the Prosecution of the Patents-In-Suit and Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof by FotoMedia Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
|
July 27, 2009 |
Filing 322
MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER - the court issues the following order concerning the claim construction issues as set forth herein.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/21/09. (ch, )
|
July 27, 2009 |
Filing 321
REPORT of Mediation by Harlan A Martin. Mediation result: Settled(ch, )
|
July 24, 2009 |
Filing 320
ORDER granting #317 Motion for Extension of Time to File Opposition to FotoMedia's motion to Sever and Stay Photobucket.com's Walker Process Counterclaim. Responses due by 7/30/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/24/09. (ehs, )
|
July 24, 2009 |
Filing 319
ORDER granting FotoMedia #318 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to motion to compel. Responses due by 7/29/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/24/09. (ehs, )
|
July 23, 2009 |
Filing 318
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #300 SEALED MOTION Photobucket.com, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Production of Documents Related to the Prosecution of the Patents-In-Suit and Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof by FotoMedia Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
|
July 22, 2009 |
Filing 317
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #293 MOTION to Stay MOTION to Sever Photobucket.com Inc.'s Walker Process Counterclaim Photobucket's Unopposed Mot for a Second Extension of Time to File Its Oppposition to Fotomedia's Mot to Sever and Stay by Photobucket.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Greer, Yvonne)
|
July 22, 2009 |
Filing 316
NOTICE of Disclosure by Shutterfly, Inc. (Nokleberg, Julie)
|
July 17, 2009 |
Filing 315
ORDER granting #314 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #300 SEALED MOTION Photobucket.com, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Production of Documents Related to the Prosecution of the Patents-In-Suit and Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof Responses due by 7/24/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/17/09. (ch, )
|
July 16, 2009 |
Filing 314
Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #300 SEALED MOTION Photobucket.com, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Production of Documents Related to the Prosecution of the Patents-In-Suit and Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof by FotoMedia Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McKool, Mike)
|
July 16, 2009 |
Filing 313
ORDER granting #312 Motion for Extension of Time to File opposition to FotoMedia Technologies, LLCs (FotoMedia) Motion to Sever and Stay Photobucket.com. Inc.s Walker Process Counterclaim. Responses due by 7/23/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/16/09. (ehs, )
|
July 15, 2009 |
Filing 312
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #293 MOTION to Stay MOTION to Sever Photobucket.com Inc.'s Walker Process Counterclaim by Photobucket.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Greer, Yvonne)
|
July 15, 2009 |
Filing 311
Sealed Document - Second Amended Answer, Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims of Defendant, Photobucket.com to Amended Complaint of Plaintiff, Fotomedia Technologies, LLC (Gillam, Harry)
|
July 15, 2009 |
Filing 310
MOTION for Leave to File Photobucket.com, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to Amend Answer, Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims to Fotomedia's Amended Complaint by Photobucket.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gillam, Harry)
|
July 15, 2009 |
Filing 309
ORDER granting #305 Motion for Leave to File Amend Answer, Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims to FotoMedia Technologies, LLCs Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/15/09. (ehs, )
|
July 15, 2009 |
Filing 308
ORDER granting #304 Motion for Leave to File document under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/15/09. (ehs, )
|
July 13, 2009 |
Filing 307
SEALED. Shutterfly, Inc.'s First Amended Answer, Affirmative Defenses, and Counterclaims to Fotomedia Technologies, LLC's Amended Complaint. (Nokleberg, Julie)
|
July 13, 2009 |
Filing 306
AFFIDAVIT in Support re #305 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer, Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims to Fotomedia Technologies, LLC's Amended Complaint filed by Shutterfly, Inc.. (Nokleberg, Julie)
|
July 13, 2009 |
Filing 305
Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer, Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims to Fotomedia Technologies, LLC's Amended Complaint by Shutterfly, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nokleberg, Julie)
|
July 13, 2009 |
Filing 304
Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal by Shutterfly, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nokleberg, Julie)
|
July 7, 2009 |
Filing 303
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James Norman Willi on behalf of FotoMedia Technologies, LLC (Willi, James)
|
July 7, 2009 |
Filing 302
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 5/28/09 Claim Construction Hearing before Judge Chad Everingham. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov. (lss, )
|
July 7, 2009 |
Filing 301
NOTICE of Disclosure by CBS Interactive Inc (Lavender, G)
|
July 6, 2009 |
Filing 300
SEALED MOTION Photobucket.com, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Production of Documents Related to the Prosecution of the Patents-In-Suit and Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof by Photobucket.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Yvonne P. Greer, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Text of Proposed Order)(Gillam, Harry)
|
July 6, 2009 |
Filing 299
ORDER granting #296 Motion for Leave to File Certain Documents Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/6/09. (ch, )
|
July 6, 2009 |
NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the 297 submitted by Photobucket.com, Inc.. Filed under wrong event. Correction should be made by one business day (ch, )
|
July 2, 2009 |
Filing 298
SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #296 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Certain Documents Under Seal, #297 Sealed Document. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10)(Gillam, Harry)
|
July 2, 2009 |
Filing 297
***FILED IN ERROR. WRONG EVENT USED. PLEASE IGNORE.Sealed Document. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Order)(Gillam, Harry) Modified on 7/6/2009 (ch, ).
|
July 2, 2009 |
Filing 296
Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Certain Documents Under Seal by AOL, LLC., Photobucket.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gillam, Harry)
|
July 2, 2009 |
Filing 295
ORDER granting #294 Motion to Amend/Correct. Deadline for completion of early mediation is is extended to an including July 22, 2009. FotoMedia and the defendants shall complete their respective mediations with Judge Harlen Martin as follows herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/2/09. (ch, )
|
July 1, 2009 |
Filing 294
Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #99 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings,, Joint Motion to Amend Docket Control Order by FotoMedia Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
|
July 1, 2009 |
Filing 293
MOTION to Stay, MOTION to Sever Photobucket.com Inc.'s Walker Process Counterclaim by FotoMedia Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McKool, Mike)
|
June 29, 2009 |
Filing 292
SEALED SURREPLY In Support of its Opposition to Plaintiff's #238 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL YAHOO! INC.'S PRODUCTION OF SOURCE CODE FOR ACCUSED INSTRUMENTALITIES filed by Yahoo!Inc.. (Partridge, Scott)
|
June 23, 2009 |
Filing 291
ORDER granting #289 Motion for Leave to File supplemental invalidity contentions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/23/09. (ehs, )
|
June 22, 2009 |
Filing 290
Sealed Document. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N)(Gillam, Harry)
|
June 22, 2009 |
Filing 289
Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to Supplement Invalidity Contentions by AOL, LLC., CNET Networks, Inc., Photobucket.com, Inc., Shutterfly, Inc., Yahoo!Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gillam, Harry)
|
June 22, 2009 |
Filing 288
NOTICE of Disclosure by Photobucket.com, Inc. Photobucket.Com, Inc's Notice of Disclosures (Swope, Richard)
|
June 17, 2009 |
Filing 287
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kristi Jean Thomas on behalf of FotoMedia Technologies, LLC (Thomas, Kristi)
|
June 16, 2009 |
Filing 286
SEALED SUR REPLY to Reply to Motion re #231 MOTION to Strike Infringement Contentions filed by FotoMedia Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Graham Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6)(Baxter, Samuel)
|
June 16, 2009 |
Filing 285
SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #238 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL YAHOO! INC.'S PRODUCTION OF SOURCE CODE FOR ACCUSED INSTRUMENTALITIES filed by FotoMedia Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Robert Graham, #2 Exhibit Exh. 1, #3 Exhibit Exh. 2, #4 Exhibit Exh. 3, #5 Exhibit Exh. 4, #6 Exhibit Exh. 5, #7 Exhibit Exh. 6)(Baxter, Samuel)
|
June 16, 2009 |
Filing 284
ORDER granting #283 Motion for Extension of Time to File Surreply to Yahoo!'s Motion to Strike Infringement Contentions (Dkt. No. 275) and its Reply in support of its Motion to Compel Production of Source Code (Dkt. No. 276). Responses due by 6/16/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/16/09. (ehs, )
|
June 15, 2009 |
Filing 283
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #231 MOTION to Strike Infringement Contentions, #238 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL YAHOO! INC.'S PRODUCTION OF SOURCE CODE FOR ACCUSED INSTRUMENTALITIES by FotoMedia Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
|
June 12, 2009 |
Filing 282
ORDER granting #281 Motion for Extension of Time to Amend. The deadline for completion of early mediation is moved to 7/1/09. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/12/09. (ch, )
|
June 11, 2009 |
Filing 281
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend Docket Control Order Regarding Early Mediation by FotoMedia Technologies, LLC, AOL, LLC., Photobucket.com, Inc., Shutterfly, Inc., CBS Interactive Inc, Yahoo!Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gillam, Harry)
|
June 8, 2009 |
Filing 280
ORDER granting #279 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. ORDERED that FotoMedias Surreply to Yahoos Motion to Strike Infringement Contentions and FotoMedias Reply in support of its Motion to Compel Production of Source Code be due on June 15, 2009 Responses due by 6/15/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/5/09. (ch, )
|
June 4, 2009 |
Filing 279
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #231 MOTION to Strike Infringement Contentions, #238 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL YAHOO! INC.'S PRODUCTION OF SOURCE CODE FOR ACCUSED INSTRUMENTALITIES PLAINTIFF FOTOMEDIA TECHNOLOGIES, LLC'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE ITS SUR-REPLY TO YAHOO!'S MOTION TO STRIKE INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS AND ITS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF SOURCE CODE by FotoMedia Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
|
May 28, 2009 |
Filing 278
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham: Markman Hearing held on 5/28/2009. (Court Reporter Susan Simmons, CSR.) (Attachments: #1 Sign in sheet) (jml)
|
May 27, 2009 |
Filing 277
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert Marc Manley on behalf of FotoMedia Technologies, LLC (Manley, Robert)
|
May 27, 2009 |
Filing 276
SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #238 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL YAHOO! INC.'S PRODUCTION OF SOURCE CODE FOR ACCUSED INSTRUMENTALITIES filed by Yahoo!Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Ali Dhanani, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Stephen Gray, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 10)(Partridge, Scott)
|
May 27, 2009 |
Filing 275
SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #231 MOTION to Strike Infringement Contentions filed by Yahoo!Inc.. (Partridge, Scott)
|
May 27, 2009 |
Filing 274
NOTICE of Disclosure by AOL, LLC., Photobucket.com, Inc. Defendant Photobucket.com's Notice of Disclosures (Swope, Richard)
|
May 26, 2009 |
Filing 273
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Yvonne P Greer on behalf of AOL, LLC., Photobucket.com, Inc. (Greer, Yvonne)
|
May 22, 2009 |
Filing 272
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Yvonne P Greer for Photobucket.com, Inc.. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-1-4705) (ehs, )
|
May 18, 2009 |
Filing 271
NOTICE by Yahoo!Inc. of Compliance with Patent Rule 4.5 (d) (Partridge, Scott)
|
May 18, 2009 |
Filing 270
ORDER granting #264 Motion to Amend/Correct. Deadline for early mediation has been moved to 6/10/09. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 5/18/09. (ch, )
|
May 15, 2009 |
Filing 269
REPLY CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by FotoMedia Technologies, LLC. (Baxter, Samuel)
|
May 15, 2009 |
Filing 268
ORDER granting #263 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Plaintiff FotoMedia Technologies, LLC shall file its reply brief pursuant to Patent Rule 4-5(c) on or before May 15,2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 5/15/09. (ch, )
|
May 15, 2009 |
Filing 267
ORDER granting #262 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: to FotoMedia's Opposition to Yahoo!'s Motion to Strike (Sealed) (Dkt. No. 253) Responses due by 5/27/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 5/15/09. (ch, )
|
May 15, 2009 |
Filing 266
ORDER granting #261 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #238 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL YAHOO! INC.'S PRODUCTION OF SOURCE CODE FOR ACCUSED INSTRUMENTALITIES Responses due by 5/27/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 5/15/09. (ch, )
|
May 15, 2009 |
Filing 265
ORDER granting #250 Motion for Leave to File Certain Documents under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 5/15/09. (ch, )
|
May 15, 2009 |
Filing 264
Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #99 Order,, Set Deadlines/Hearings, Joint Motion to Amend Docket Control Order with regard to Early Mediation by FotoMedia Technologies, LLC, AOL, LLC., CNET Networks, Inc., Photobucket.com, Inc., Shutterfly, Inc., Yahoo!Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gillam, Harry)
|
May 14, 2009 |
Filing 263
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #259 Sealed Patent Response to Non-Motion, by FotoMedia Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
|
May 13, 2009 |
Filing 262
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #253 Sealed Patent Response to Sealed Patent Motion,, by Yahoo!Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Partridge, Scott)
|
May 13, 2009 |
Filing 261
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #238 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL YAHOO! INC.'S PRODUCTION OF SOURCE CODE FOR ACCUSED INSTRUMENTALITIES by Yahoo!Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Partridge, Scott)
|
May 7, 2009 |
Filing 260
SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #259 Sealed Patent Response to Non-Motion,. (Partridge, Scott) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/8/2009: #1 Index Page) (ch, ).
|
May 7, 2009 |
Filing 259
SEALED PATENT RESPONSE by Yahoo!Inc. to #239 Claim Construction Brief, filed by Yahoo!Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Lisa Kelly, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K)(Partridge, Scott)
|
May 7, 2009 |
Filing 258
NOTICE by FotoMedia Technologies, LLC re #252 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct PLAINTIFF FOTOMEDIA TECHNOLOGIES, LLC'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND AND SERVE SUPPLEMENTAL INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS PLAINTIFF FOTOMEDIA TECHNOLOGIES, LLC'S AGREED NOTICE IN RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT YAHOO! INC.'S NOTICE OF PARTIAL OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF FOTOMEDIA TECHNOLOGIES, LLC'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND AND SERVE SUPPLEMENTAL INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS (Baxter, Samuel)
|
May 7, 2009 |
Filing 257
ORDER granting #254 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff FotoMedia Technologies, LLCs Motion to Compel Yahoo!s Production of Source Code for Accused Instrumentalities. Responses due by 5/13/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 5/7/09. (ehs, )
|
May 6, 2009 |
Filing 256
NOTICE by Yahoo!Inc. re #252 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct PLAINTIFF FOTOMEDIA TECHNOLOGIES, LLC'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND AND SERVE SUPPLEMENTAL INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Partridge, Scott)
|
May 6, 2009 |
Filing 255
Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages of Claim Construction Briefing by Yahoo!Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Partridge, Scott)
|
May 6, 2009 |
Filing 254
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #238 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL YAHOO! INC.'S PRODUCTION OF SOURCE CODE FOR ACCUSED INSTRUMENTALITIES by Yahoo!Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Partridge, Scott)
|
May 5, 2009 |
Filing 253
SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re #231 MOTION to Strike Infringement Contentions filed by FotoMedia Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Jake Richter, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Robert G. Graham, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18, #21 Exhibit 19, #22 Exhibit 20, #23 Exhibit 21)(Baxter, Samuel)
|
May 5, 2009 |
Filing 252
Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct PLAINTIFF FOTOMEDIA TECHNOLOGIES, LLC'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND AND SERVE SUPPLEMENTAL INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS by FotoMedia Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
|
May 4, 2009 |
Filing 251
SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #223 Unopposed SEALED MOTION for Leave to Amend Answer, Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims to Amended Complaint and Motion Under Rule 19 and Rule 20 of the F.R.C.P. to Add Flashpoint Technology Inc. and Scenera Research LLC as Parties to Amended Comp filed by Photobucket.com, Inc.. (Ramsey, Gabriel) Modified on 5/5/2009 (ch, ).
|
May 4, 2009 |
Filing 250
Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Documents by Photobucket.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ramsey, Gabriel)
|
May 4, 2009 |
Filing 249
SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #251 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3A, #4 Exhibit 3B, #5 Exhibit 3C, #6 Exhibit 3D, #7 Exhibit 3E, #8 Exhibit 4, #9 Exhibit 5, #10 Exhibit 6, #11 Exhibit 7, #12 Exhibit 8, #13 Exhibit 9, #14 Exhibit 10, #15 Exhibit 11, #16 Exhibit 12, #17 Exhibit 13A, #18 Exhibit 13B, #19 Exhibit 13C, #20 Exhibit 13D, #21 Exhibit 13E, #22 Exhibit 13F, #23 Exhibit 13G, #24 Exhibit 13H, #25 Exhibit 13I, #26 Exhibit 13J, #27 Exhibit 13K)(Ramsey, Gabriel) Modified on 5/5/2009 (ch, ).
|
May 4, 2009 |
Filing 248
***FILED IN ERROR. NOT IN PDF SEARCHABLE FORMAT. PLEASE IGNORE.***SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #223 Unopposed SEALED MOTION for Leave to Amend Answer, Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims to Amended Complaint and Motion Under Rule 19 and Rule 20 of the F.R.C.P. to Add Flashpoint Technology Inc. and Scenera Research LLC as Parties to Amended Comp filed by Photobucket.com, Inc.. (Ramsey, Gabriel) Modified on 5/4/2009 (ch, ).
|
May 4, 2009 |
Filing 247
FILED IN ERROR. NOT IN PDF SEARCHABLE FORMAT. PLEASE IGNORE***Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Certain Documents Under Seal by Photobucket.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ramsey, Gabriel) Modified on 5/4/2009 (ch, ). Modified on 5/4/2009 (ch, ).
|
May 4, 2009 |
Filing 246
NOTICE of Disclosure by Photobucket.com, Inc. (Swope, Richard)
|
May 4, 2009 |
NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the 247 submitted by Photobucket.com, Inc.. Motion is not in pdf searchable format.. Correction should be made by one business day. Motion has been terminated. (ch, )
|
May 4, 2009 |
NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the 248 submitted by Photobucket.com, Inc.. Sealed Reply is not in pdf searchable format. Correction should be made by one business day. Reply was terminated. (ch, )
|
May 1, 2009 |
Filing 245
RESPONSE to #224 Response to Non-Motion Response to First Amended Answer, Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims of Defendant Photobucket.com by FotoMedia Technologies, LLC. (Hill, David)
|
May 1, 2009 |
Filing 244
ORDER granting #243 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #231 MOTION to Strike Infringement Contentions Responses due by 5/5/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 5/1/09. (ch, )
|
April 30, 2009 |
Filing 243
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #231 MOTION to Strike Infringement Contentions by FotoMedia Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
|
April 29, 2009 |
Filing 242
ORDER granting #241 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Otis W Carroll Jr. added for Yahoo!Inc. Attorney John Frederick Bufe and Michael Edwin Jones terminated as counsel for Yahoo!Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 4/29/09. (ehs, )
|
April 27, 2009 |
Filing 241
Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Yahoo!Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
|
April 24, 2009 |
Filing 240
RESPONSE to Motion re #223 Unopposed SEALED MOTION for Leave to Amend Answer, Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims to Amended Complaint and Motion Under Rule 19 and Rule 20 of the F.R.C.P. to Add Flashpoint Technology Inc. and Scenera Research LLC as Parties to Amended Comp filed by FotoMedia Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Hill, David)
|
April 23, 2009 |
Filing 239
CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by FotoMedia Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(Baxter, Samuel)
|
April 23, 2009 |
Filing 238
SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL YAHOO! INC.'S PRODUCTION OF SOURCE CODE FOR ACCUSED INSTRUMENTALITIES by FotoMedia Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Robert G. Graham, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24, #26 Exhibit 25, #27 Exhibit 26, #28 Exhibit B, #29 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
|
April 21, 2009 |
Filing 237
ORDER granting #235 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to respond to Photobuckets Amended Answer and Counterclaims. Responses due by 5/1/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 4/21/09. (ehs, )
|
April 21, 2009 |
Filing 236
ORDER granting #234 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to the opposed portions of Photobuckets Motion for Leave. Responses due by 4/24/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 4/21/09. (ehs, )
|
April 15, 2009 |
Filing 235
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Photobucket's First Amended Answer and Counterclaims by FotoMedia Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tautfest, Eric)
|
April 15, 2009 |
Filing 234
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Opposed Portions of Docket #225 by FotoMedia Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tautfest, Eric)
|
April 14, 2009 |
Filing 233
SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #232 Affidavit in Support of Motion,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit E)(Partridge, Scott)
|
April 14, 2009 |
Filing 232
AFFIDAVIT in Support re #231 MOTION to Strike Infringement Contentions Declaration of Lisa Kelly filed by Yahoo!Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit F, #6 Exhibit G, #7 Exhibit H, #8 Exhibit I, #9 Exhibit J, #10 Exhibit K)(Partridge, Scott)
|
April 14, 2009 |
Filing 231
MOTION to Strike Infringement Contentions by Yahoo!Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Partridge, Scott)
|
April 4, 2009 |
Filing 230
RESPONSE to #212 Sealed Document PLAINTIFF'S REPLY TO YAHOO! INC.'S FIRST AMENDED COUNTERCLAIMS by FotoMedia Technologies, LLC. (Baxter, Samuel)
|
April 3, 2009 |
Filing 229
ORDER granting in part and withholding in part #223 Sealed Motionfor leave to amend answer, affirmative defenses and counterclaims to Fotomedia's amended complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 4/3/09. (ehs, )
|
April 2, 2009 |
Filing 228
ORDER granting #225 Motion for Leave to File Its Unopposed Motion for Leave to Amend Answer, Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims to Fotomedias Amended Complaint and Motion Under Rule 19 and Rule 20 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure to Add Flashpoint Technology, Inc. and Scenera Research LLC as Parties to Photobucket.com Inc.s Amended Counterclaim and the First Amended Answer, Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims of Defendant Photobucket.com to Amended Complaint of Plaintiff Fotomedia Technologies, LLC Under Seal, the Court finds that this motion should be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 4/2/09. (ehs, )
|
April 1, 2009 |
Filing 227
NOTICE by FotoMedia Technologies, LLC re #223 Unopposed SEALED MOTION for Leave to Amend Answer, Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims to Amended Complaint and Motion Under Rule 19 and Rule 20 of the F.R.C.P. to Add Flashpoint Technology Inc. and Scenera Research LLC as Parties to Amended Comp NOTICE OF OPPOSITION (Baxter, Samuel)
|
April 1, 2009 |
Filing 226
ORDER granting #221 Motion for Leave to Supplement Invalidity Contentions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 4/1/09. (ch, )
|
March 31, 2009 |
Filing 225
Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Certain Documents Under Seal by Photobucket.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gillam, Harry)
|
March 31, 2009 |
Filing 224
SEALED First Amended Answer, Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims of Defendant PHOTOBUCKET.COM to #64 Amended Complaint of Plaintiff Fotomedia Technologies, LLC filed by Photobucket.com, Inc.. (Gillam, Harry)
|
March 31, 2009 |
Filing 223
Unopposed SEALED MOTION for Leave to Amend Answer, Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims to Amended Complaint and Motion Under Rule 19 and Rule 20 of the F.R.C.P. to Add Flashpoint Technology Inc. and Scenera Research LLC as Parties to Amended Complaint by Photobucket.com, Inc.. (Gillam, Harry) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/31/2009: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (ch, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/2/2009: #2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Opposed Motion to Join Additional Parties (Revised), #3 Text of Proposed Order Granting Unopposed Motion for Leave to Amend Answer (Revised)) (mpv, ).
|
March 31, 2009 |
Filing 222
***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE*** MOTION for Leave to File Certain Documents Under Seal by Photobucket.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gillam, Harry) Modified on 3/31/2009 (ch, ).
|
March 31, 2009 |
Filing 221
Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Invalidity Contentions by AOL, LLC., Photobucket.com, Inc., Shutterfly, Inc., CBS Interactive Inc, Yahoo!Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nokleberg, Julie)
|
March 31, 2009 |
***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 222, Motion for Leave to file. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (Atty must refile to include Certificate of Conference)(ch, )
|
March 25, 2009 |
Filing 220
ORDER granting #215 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dieter H Hellmoldt terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 3/25/09. (ehs, )
|
March 25, 2009 |
Filing 219
ORDER granting #214 Motion to Withdraw Dieter H Hellmoldt is withdrawn as counsel for AOL LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 3/25/09. (ehs, )
|
March 25, 2009 |
Filing 218
NOTICE by CBS Interactive Inc Notice of Service of Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Common Interrogatories (Carter, Laura)
|
March 24, 2009 |
Filing 217
NOTICE by AOL, LLC. Notice of Service of Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Common Interrogatories (Gillam, Harry)
|
March 24, 2009 |
Filing 216
NOTICE by Photobucket.com, Inc. Notice of Service of Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Common Interrogatories (Gillam, Harry)
|
March 24, 2009 |
Filing 215
Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Unopposed Motion for Withdrawal of Counsel by Photobucket.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gillam, Harry)
|
March 24, 2009 |
Filing 214
Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw Unopposed Motion for Withdrawal of Counsel by AOL, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gillam, Harry)
|
March 23, 2009 |
Filing 213
ORDER granting #211 Sealed Motion for Leave to Amend Answer and Affirmative Defenses to FotoMedias Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 3/23/09. (ehs, )
|
March 20, 2009 |
Filing 212
Sealed Document. Yahoo! Inc's First Amended Answer and Affirmative Defenses to the Amended Complaint and Counterclaims Thereto. (Partridge, Scott)
|
March 20, 2009 |
Filing 211
Unopposed SEALED MOTION for Leave to Amend Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Fotomedia's Amended Complaint by Yahoo!Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: First Set of Interrogatories to Yahoo! Inc, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Partridge, Scott)
|
March 20, 2009 |
Filing 210
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael J Sacksteder on behalf of Shutterfly, Inc. (Sacksteder, Michael)
|
March 9, 2009 |
Filing 209
NOTICE by FotoMedia Technologies, LLC, AOL, LLC., Photobucket.com, Inc., Shutterfly, Inc., CBS Interactive Inc, Yahoo!Inc. JOINT CLAIM CONSTRUCTION AND PREHEARING STATEMENT PURSUANT TO PATENT RULE 4-3 FOR U.S. PATENT NOS. 6,018,774, 6,542,936 AND 6,871,231 (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Exhibit B)(Baxter, Samuel)
|
February 9, 2009 |
Filing 208
NOTICE of Disclosure by AOL, LLC., Photobucket.com, Inc. Defendants' Notice of Disclosure (Swope, Richard)
|
February 9, 2009 |
Filing 207
NOTICE of Disclosure by FotoMedia Technologies, LLC (Baxter, Samuel)
|
January 29, 2009 |
Filing 206
NOTICE of Change of Address by Eric Sean Tautfest (Tautfest, Eric)
|
January 26, 2009 |
Filing 205
NOTICE by AOL, LLC., Photobucket.com, Inc. re #204 Order on Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Invalidity Contentions (Hellmoldt, Dieter)
|
January 26, 2009 |
Filing 204
ORDER granting #203 Motion for Leave to File Supplement its Invalidity Contentions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 1/26/09. (ch, )
|
January 26, 2009 |
Filing 203
***REPLACES #202***Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Invalidity Contentions by AOL, LLC., Photobucket.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hellmoldt, Dieter) Modified on 1/26/2009 (mpv, ).
|
January 26, 2009 |
NOTICE of Deficiency regarding #202 the Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Invalidity Contentions by AOL, LLC., Photobucket.com, Inc submitted Pleading not assigned by attorney, attorney to correct and refile. Correction should be made by one business day. Motion terminated by clerk. (mpv, )
|
January 23, 2009 |
Filing 202
***FILED IN ERROR; PLEASE IGNORE***Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Invalidity Contentions by AOL, LLC., Photobucket.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Supplement 1st Supplemental Invalidity Contention, #3 Exhibit Ex. A, #4 Exhibit Ex B, #5 Exhibit Ex C, #6 Exhibit Ex D, #7 Exhibit Ex F, #8 Exhibit Ex G, #9 Exhibit Ex H, #10 Exhibit Ex I, #11 Exhibit Ex J, #12 Exhibit Ex K, #13 Exhibit Ex L, #14 Exhibit Ex M, #15 Exhibit Ex N, #16 Exhibit Ex O, #17 Exhibit Ex P, #18 Exhibit Ex E)(Hellmoldt, Dieter) Modified on 1/26/2009 (mpv, ).
|
January 21, 2009 |
Filing 201
ORDER granting #197 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. The deadline for notifying the Court that no disputes exist concerning privileged documents or information is four (4) weeks from the date Plaintiff FotoMedia Technologies, LLC provides Defendants with a revised privilege log (if applicable).. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 1/21/09. (ehs, )
|
January 16, 2009 |
Filing 200
NOTICE of Disclosure by AOL, LLC., Photobucket.com, Inc., Shutterfly, Inc., CBS Interactive Inc, Yahoo!Inc. (Hellmoldt, Dieter)
|
January 16, 2009 |
Filing 199
NOTICE of Disclosure by FotoMedia Technologies, LLC (Baxter, Samuel)
|
January 16, 2009 |
Filing 198
NOTICE by Yahoo!Inc. Notice of Compliance (Morico, Paul)
|
January 16, 2009 |
Filing 197
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Joint Motion to Extend Deadline in Discovery and Docket Control Order by Shutterfly, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nokleberg, Julie)
|
January 12, 2009 |
Filing 196
ORDER granting #194 Motion leave to supplement invalidity contentions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 1/12/09. (ehs, )
|
January 9, 2009 |
Filing 195
SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #194 Unopposed MOTION Leave to Supplement Invalidity Contentions. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B, #2 Exhibit C)(Partridge, Scott)
|
January 9, 2009 |
Filing 194
Unopposed MOTION Leave to Supplement Invalidity Contentions by Yahoo!Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Partridge, Scott)
|
December 11, 2008 |
Filing 193
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gabriel M Ramsey on behalf of Photobucket.com, Inc. (Ramsey, Gabriel)
|
December 10, 2008 |
Filing 192
NOTICE of Disclosure by FotoMedia Technologies, LLC (Hill, David)
|
December 1, 2008 |
Filing 191
ORDER granting #190 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Deadline extended to 1/16/09. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 12/1/08. (ehs, )
|
November 28, 2008 |
Filing 190
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Joint Motion to Extend Deadline in Discovery and Docket Control Order by FotoMedia Technologies, LLC, AOL, LLC., Photobucket.com, Inc., Shutterfly, Inc., CBS Interactive Inc, Yahoo!Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nokleberg, Julie)
|
November 10, 2008 |
Filing 189
PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 11/10/08. (ehs, )
|
October 30, 2008 |
Filing 188
NOTICE of Disclosure by FotoMedia Technologies, LLC (Hill, David)
|
October 29, 2008 |
Filing 187
NOTICE of Disclosure by CNET Networks, Inc., CBS Interactive Inc re Privilege Logs (Carter, Laura)
|
October 29, 2008 |
Filing 186
NOTICE of Disclosure by Shutterfly, Inc. (Nokleberg, Julie)
|
October 29, 2008 |
Filing 185
NOTICE of Disclosure by Yahoo!Inc. (Partridge, Scott)
|
October 28, 2008 |
Filing 184
RESPONSE to #167 Answer to Amended Complaint PLAINTIFF'S REPLY TO PHOTOBUCKET.COM, INC.'S COUNTERCLAIMS by FotoMedia Technologies, LLC. (Baxter, Samuel)
|
October 28, 2008 |
Filing 183
RESPONSE to #166 Answer to Amended Complaint PLAINTIFF'S REPLY TO AOL, LLC'S COUNTERCLAIMS by FotoMedia Technologies, LLC. (Baxter, Samuel)
|
October 28, 2008 |
Filing 182
ANSWER to #165 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by FotoMedia Technologies, LLC.(Baxter, Samuel)
|
October 28, 2008 |
Filing 181
ANSWER to #170 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by FotoMedia Technologies, LLC.(Baxter, Samuel)
|
October 28, 2008 |
Filing 180
NOTICE of Disclosure by Photobucket.com, Inc. Regarding Privilege Logs (Hellmoldt, Dieter)
|
October 28, 2008 |
Filing 179
NOTICE of Disclosure by AOL, LLC. Regarding Privilege Logs (Hellmoldt, Dieter)
|
October 28, 2008 |
Filing 178
ANSWER to #164 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by FotoMedia Technologies, LLC.(Baxter, Samuel)
|
October 23, 2008 |
Filing 177
ORDER granting #176 Motion name change of deft DNET Networks Inc to CBS Interactive Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 10/23/08. (ehs, )
|
October 22, 2008 |
Filing 176
Unopposed MOTION to Change Name re #172 Notice (Other) by CNET Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Carter, Laura) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/23/2008: #2 Order without Date and Signature line) (ch, ).
|
October 22, 2008 |
Filing 175
***FILED IN ERROR. ATTORNEY REFILED SEE DOCUMENT #176 ***Unopposed MOTION TO CHANGE NAME re #172 Notice (Other) by CNET Networks, Inc.. (Carter, Laura) Modified on 10/22/2008 (ch, ).
|
October 22, 2008 |
***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 175, Motion to Change Name. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (Attorney refiled see # 176)(ch, )
|
October 20, 2008 |
***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 174, Motion. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (Attorney must refile, needs Certificate of Conference)(ch, )
|
October 17, 2008 |
Filing 174
***FILED IN ERROR. ATTORNEY MUST REFILE*** MOTION re #172 Notice (Other) DEFENDANT AND COUNTERCLAIMANT CNET NETWORKS, INC.'S MOTION TO CHANGE NAME by CNET Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Carter, Laura) Modified on 10/20/2008 (ch, ).
|
October 10, 2008 |
Filing 173
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by CNET Networks, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent CBS INTERACTIVE INC. for CNET Networks, Inc., CNET Networks, Inc.. (Carter, Laura)
|
October 10, 2008 |
Filing 172
NOTICE by CNET Networks, Inc. RE NAME CHANGE FROM CNET NETWORKS, INC. TO CBS INTERACTIVE INC. (Carter, Laura)
|
October 8, 2008 |
Filing 171
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Shutterfly, Inc. (Kohm, Bryan)
|
October 8, 2008 |
Filing 170
ANSWER to #64 Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM of Non-Infringement and Invalidity against FotoMedia Technologies, LLC by Shutterfly, Inc..(Kohm, Bryan)
|
October 8, 2008 |
Filing 169
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Photobucket.com, Inc (Fox Interactive Media and News Corporation are parent corporations) (Hellmoldt, Dieter) Modified on 10/9/2008 (sm, ).
|
October 8, 2008 |
Filing 168
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by AOL, LLC. (Parent Corporation is Time Warner) (Hellmoldt, Dieter) Modified on 10/9/2008 (sm, ).
|
October 8, 2008 |
Filing 167
Defendant PhotoBucket.com, Inc.'s ANSWER to #64 Amended Complaint of Plaintiff FotoMedia Technologies, LLC by Photobucket.com, Inc..(Hellmoldt, Dieter)
|
October 8, 2008 |
Filing 166
Defendant AOL LLC's ANSWER to #64 Amended Complaint of Plaintiff FotoMedia Technologies, LLC by AOL, LLC..(Hellmoldt, Dieter)
|
October 8, 2008 |
Filing 165
ANSWER to #64 Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against FotoMedia Technologies, LLC by CNET Networks, Inc..(Michael, Patrick)
|
October 8, 2008 |
Filing 164
ANSWER to #64 Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against FotoMedia Technologies, LLC by Yahoo!Inc..(Partridge, Scott)
|
September 25, 2008 |
Filing 163
Joint MOTION for Protective Order by FotoMedia Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Text of Proposed Protective Order)(Hill, David)
|
September 24, 2008 |
Filing 162
MEMORANDUM ORDER - the court is of the opinon that the findings and conclusions of the Magistrate Judge are correct. Therefore, the court hereby adopts the report of the Magistrate Judge as the findings and conclusions of this court. Accordingly the court denies the dfts motion to dismiss or, in the alternative, for a more definite statement. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 9/24/08. (ch, )
|
September 18, 2008 |
Filing 160
TRANSCRIPT of Motion to Compel held on 9/12/08 before Judge Everingham. Court Reporter: Shelly Holmes, CSR,Telephone number: (903) 663-5082. (11 pgs)NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/9/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/20/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/17/2008. (tja, )
|
September 16, 2008 |
Filing 159
NOTICE of Disclosure by Photobucket.com, Inc. (Hellmoldt, Dieter)
|
September 16, 2008 |
Filing 158
NOTICE of Disclosure by AOL, LLC. (Hellmoldt, Dieter)
|
September 16, 2008 |
Filing 157
ORDER - granting in part and denying in part #110 Motion for Protective Order; denying as moot per agreement by the parties #128 Motion to Compel; denying #130 Motion for Joinder. Parties are ordered to submit a protective order confirming to the ruling herein within 7 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 9/16/08. (ch, )
|
September 12, 2008 |
Filing 161
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham: Motion Hearing held on 9/12/2008 re #128 MOTION to Compel PLAINTIFF TO AMEND ITS INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS; AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF filed by Photobucket.com, Inc., AOL, LLC.. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR.) (jml, )
|
September 12, 2008 |
Filing 156
ORDER granting #154 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Deadline extended to 9/22/08. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 9/12/08. (ehs, )
|
September 11, 2008 |
Filing 155
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gary Scott Kitchen on behalf of FotoMedia Technologies, LLC (Kitchen, Gary)
|
September 11, 2008 |
Filing 154
MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery to Produce Documents (Unopposed) by Yahoo!Inc.. (Morico, Paul) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/11/2008: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (mpv, ).
|
August 29, 2008 |
Filing 153
NOTICE of Hearing: Hearing on All Pending Discovery Motions set for 9/12/2008 11:00 AM in Mag Ctrm (Marshall) before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham. (jml, )
|
August 29, 2008 |
Filing 152
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 71 MOTION for More Definite Statement MOTION to Strike filed by Yahoo!Inc., #66 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, for a More Definite Statement, and Motion to Strike; and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Yahoo!Inc. Based on the foregoing, the undersigned recommends denying Yahoos motion to dismiss or, in the alternative, motion for more definite statement (#66, 71). The undersigned also recommends the denial of the motions with respect to the remaining defendants (see #67, 68, 69, 70).. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 8/29/08. (ch, )
|
August 26, 2008 |
Filing 151
REPLY to Response to Motion re #145 MOTION to Consolidate Cases Defendants' Opposition to Alltel's Motion to Consolidate Claim Construction filed by FotoMedia Technologies, LLC. (Hill, David)
|
August 25, 2008 |
Filing 150
ORDER granting #149 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Discovery Order is modified as follows herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 8/25/08. (ch, )
|
August 22, 2008 |
Filing 149
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Regarding Motion to Extend the Deadline to Produce Privilege Logs by FotoMedia Technologies, LLC, AOL, LLC., Photobucket.com, Inc., Shutterfly, Inc., CNET Networks, Inc., Yahoo!Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hellmoldt, Dieter)
|
August 19, 2008 |
Filing 148
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Leslie Dale Ware on behalf of FotoMedia Technologies, LLC (Ware, Leslie)
|
August 19, 2008 |
Filing 147
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric Sean Tautfest on behalf of FotoMedia Technologies, LLC (Tautfest, Eric)
|
August 6, 2008 |
Filing 146
***REPLACES #145***NOTICE by AOL, LLC., Photobucket.com, Inc., Shutterfly, Inc., CNET Networks, Inc., Yahoo!Inc. In Opposition to Alltel's Motion to Consolidate Claim Construction filed in 2:07-cv-256 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hellmoldt, Dieter) Modified on 8/7/2008 (mpv, ).
|
August 6, 2008 |
Filing 145
***FILED IN ERROR; PLEASE IGNORE*** MOTION to Consolidate Cases Defendants' Opposition to Alltel's Motion to Consolidate Claim Construction by AOL, LLC., Photobucket.com, Inc., Shutterfly, Inc., CNET Networks, Inc., Yahoo!Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hellmoldt, Dieter) Modified on 8/6/2008 (mpv, ).
|
August 6, 2008 |
NOTICE of Deficiency regarding #145 the MOTION to Consolidate Cases Defendants' Opposition to Alltel's Motion to Consolidate Claim Construction by AOL, LLC., Photobucket.com, Inc., Shutterfly, Inc., CNET Networks, Inc., Yahoo!Inc submitted Incorrect docket event chosen, attorney to refile as a Response in Opposition to Motion.. Correction should be made by one business day. (mpv, )
|
August 6, 2008 |
NOTICE of Deficiency regarding #145 the MOTION to Consolidate Cases Defendants' Opposition to Alltel's Motion to Consolidate Claim Construction by AOL, LLC., Photobucket.com, Inc., Shutterfly, Inc., CNET Networks, Inc., Yahoo!Inc submitted Incorrect docket event chosen, attorney to refile as a Response in Opposition to Motion.. Correction should be made by one business day. (mpv, )
|
July 24, 2008 |
Filing 144
NOTICE of Disclosure by CNET Networks, Inc. (Lavender, G)
|
July 22, 2008 |
Filing 143
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Heather Nicole Mewes on behalf of Shutterfly, Inc. (Mewes, Heather)
|
July 22, 2008 |
Filing 142
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Julie A Nokleberg on behalf of Shutterfly, Inc. (Nokleberg, Julie)
|
July 22, 2008 |
Filing 141
NOTICE of Disclosure by Shutterfly, Inc. (Mewes, Heather)
|
July 21, 2008 |
Filing 140
NOTICE of Disclosure by Photobucket.com, Inc. (Hellmoldt, Dieter)
|
July 21, 2008 |
Filing 139
NOTICE of Disclosure by AOL, LLC. (Hellmoldt, Dieter)
|
July 18, 2008 |
Filing 138
NOTICE of Disclosure by FotoMedia Technologies, LLC (Hill, David)
|
July 18, 2008 |
Filing 137
NOTICE of Disclosure by Yahoo!Inc. (Partridge, Scott)
|
July 11, 2008 |
Filing 136
REPLY to Response to Motion re #128 MOTION to Compel PLAINTIFF TO AMEND ITS INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS; AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF Adoption and Joinder in AOL LLC and Photobucket.Com, Inc.'s Reply to Fotomedia's Opposition to its Motion to Compel Plaintiff to Amend its Infringement Contentions filed by Yahoo!Inc.. (Partridge, Scott)
|
July 11, 2008 |
Filing 135
REPLY to Response to Motion re #128 MOTION to Compel PLAINTIFF TO AMEND ITS INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS; AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF filed by AOL, LLC., Photobucket.com, Inc.. (Hellmoldt, Dieter)
|
July 11, 2008 |
Filing 134
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Richard S Swope on behalf of AOL, LLC., Photobucket.com, Inc. (Swope, Richard)
|
July 2, 2008 |
Filing 133
ORDER granting #131 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. The Discovery Order is modified as follows herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/2/08. (ch, )
|
June 30, 2008 |
Filing 132
RESPONSE in Opposition re #128 MOTION to Compel PLAINTIFF TO AMEND ITS INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS; AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF filed by FotoMedia Technologies, LLC. (Olivo, John) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/1/2008: #1 Certificate of Service) (mpv, ).
|
June 30, 2008 |
Filing 131
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Joint Motion to Expand Deadlines to Comply with Discovery Order and to Clarify Discovery Obligations by FotoMedia Technologies, LLC, AOL, LLC., Photobucket.com, Inc., Shutterfly, Inc., CNET Networks, Inc., Yahoo!Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gillam, Harry)
|
June 16, 2008 |
Filing 130
MOTION for Joinder in AOL and Photobucket's Motion to Compel Plaintiff to Amend Its Infringement Contentions by Yahoo!Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Paul Morico, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit Exhibit G)(Partridge, Scott)
|
June 13, 2008 |
Filing 129
AFFIDAVIT in Support re #128 MOTION to Compel PLAINTIFF TO AMEND ITS INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS; AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF filed by AOL, LLC., Photobucket.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Hellmoldt, Dieter)
|
June 13, 2008 |
Filing 128
MOTION to Compel PLAINTIFF TO AMEND ITS INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS; AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF by AOL, LLC., Photobucket.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hellmoldt, Dieter)
|
June 11, 2008 |
Filing 127
NOTICE by AOL, LLC., Photobucket.com, Inc., Shutterfly, Inc., CNET Networks, Inc., Yahoo!Inc. NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE (Hellmoldt, Dieter)
|
June 3, 2008 |
Filing 126
ORDER granting #125 Dft's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Comply with P.R. 3-3 and P.R. 3-4. Deadlines is extended to 6/9/08. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/3/08. (ch, )
|
June 2, 2008 |
Filing 125
***REPLACES #124*** MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadlines to Comply with P.R. 3-3 and P.R. 3-4 by AOL, LLC., Photobucket.com, Inc., Shutterfly, Inc., CNET Networks, Inc., Yahoo!Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gillam, Harry) Modified on 6/3/2008 (mpv, ).
|
June 2, 2008 |
Filing 124
***FILED IN ERROR; PER ATTY; PLEASE IGNORE*** MOTION for Extension of Time to File Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadlines to Comply with P.R. 3-3 and P.R. 3-4 by AOL, LLC., Photobucket.com, Inc., Shutterfly, Inc., CNET Networks, Inc., Yahoo!Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gillam, Harry) Modified on 6/2/2008 (mpv, ).
|
June 2, 2008 |
Filing 123
ORDER granting #122 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Deadlines are extended as follows. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/2/08. (ch, )
|
June 2, 2008 |
***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY; Document # 124, MOTION for Extension of Time to File Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadlines to Comply with P.R. 3-3 and P.R. 3-4 by AOL, LLC., Photobucket.com, Inc., Shutterfly, Inc., CNET Networks, Inc., Yahoo!Inc. PLEASE IGNORE. ATTORNEY WILL REFILE*** (mpv, )
|
May 30, 2008 |
Filing 122
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Agreed Motion to Extend Deadlines In Docket Control and Discovery Orders by FotoMedia Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kohm, Bryan)
|
May 27, 2008 |
Filing 121
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Marcus T Hall for CNET Networks, Inc. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 2-1-3819. (ch, )
|
May 20, 2008 |
Filing 120
ORDER granting #119 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Deadline extended to 6/2/08. Signed by Judge Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 5/20/08. (ehs, )
|
May 19, 2008 |
Filing 119
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Motion to Extend Deadlines to Comply with P.R. 3-3 and P.R. 3-4 by FotoMedia Technologies, LLC, AOL, LLC., Photobucket.com, Inc., Shutterfly, Inc., CNET Networks, Inc., Yahoo!Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gillam, Harry)
|
May 15, 2008 |
Filing 118
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney David M Hill for FotoMedia Technologies, LLC. (FEE PAID) 2-1-3784 (ehs, )
|
May 15, 2008 |
Filing 117
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Robert G Graham for FotoMedia Technologies, LLC. (FEE PAID) 2-1-3784 (ehs, )
|
May 15, 2008 |
Filing 116
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney John F Ward for FotoMedia Technologies, LLC. (FEE PAID) 2-1-3784 (ehs, )
|
May 15, 2008 |
Filing 115
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney John W Olivo, Jr for FotoMedia Technologies, LLC. (FEE PAID) 2-1-3784 (ehs, )
|
April 11, 2008 |
Filing 114
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William Wayne Oxley on behalf of Photobucket.com, Inc. (Oxley, William)
|
April 7, 2008 |
Filing 113
NOTICE by FotoMedia Technologies, LLC NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE (McKool, Mike)
|
March 31, 2008 |
Filing 112
NOTICE of Disclosure by FotoMedia Technologies, LLC (McKool, Mike)
|
March 21, 2008 |
Filing 111
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Bryan Alexander Kohm on behalf of Shutterfly, Inc. (Kohm, Bryan)
|
March 21, 2008 |
Filing 110
Joint MOTION for Protective Order by FotoMedia Technologies, LLC, AOL, LLC., Photobucket.com, Inc., Shutterfly, Inc., CNET Networks, Inc., Yahoo!Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Text of Proposed Order)(McKool, Mike)
|
March 20, 2008 |
Filing 109
ORDER granting #100 Motion to extend discovery deadline. Deadline for parties to submit an Agreed Protective Order is extended to 3/21/08. Signed by Judge Charles Everingham on 3/20/08. (ehs, )
|
March 19, 2008 |
Filing 108
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Paul R Gupta for AOL, LLC. and Photobucket.com, Inc.. (America Online dismissed from case) (FEE PAID) 2-1-3610 (ehs, )
|
March 17, 2008 |
Filing 107
NOTICE of Disclosure by Photobucket.com, Inc. Pursuant to Paragraph One of the Discovery Order (Gillam, Harry)
|
March 17, 2008 |
Filing 106
NOTICE of Disclosure by AOL, LLC. Pursuant to Paragrph One of the Discovery Order (Gillam, Harry)
|
March 17, 2008 |
Filing 105
NOTICE of Disclosure by FotoMedia Technologies, LLC (Baxter, Samuel)
|
March 14, 2008 |
Filing 104
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by CNET Networks, Inc. identifying none as Corporate Parent. (Carter, Laura)
|
March 14, 2008 |
Filing 103
NOTICE of Disclosure by CNET Networks, Inc. Pursuant to Local Rule CV-26(c) (Carter, Laura)
|
March 14, 2008 |
Filing 102
NOTICE of Disclosure by Shutterfly, Inc. (Kohm, Bryan)
|
March 14, 2008 |
Filing 101
NOTICE of Disclosure by Yahoo!Inc. of Service of Initial Disclosures (Partridge, Scott)
|
March 14, 2008 |
Filing 100
Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #98 Order by FotoMedia Technologies, LLC, AOL, LLC., Photobucket.com, Inc., Shutterfly, Inc., CNET Networks, Inc., Yahoo!Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McKool, Mike)
|
February 29, 2008 |
Filing 99
DOCKET CONTROL ORDER -Amended Pleadings due by 7/18/2008.,Discovery due by 8/24/2009.,Joinder of Parties due by 4/1/2008.,Markman Hearing set for 5/28/2009 09:00 AM before Judge T. John Ward.,Motions due by 10/19/2009.,Proposed Pretrial Order due by 10/19/2009., Jury Selection set for 11/2/2009 09:00AM before Judge T. John Ward., Pretrial Conference set for 10/22/2009 09:00 AM before Judge T. John Ward.. Signed by Judge Charles Everingham on 2/29/08. (ehs, )
|
February 29, 2008 |
Filing 98
DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Judge Charles Everingham on 2/29/08. (ehs, )
|
February 28, 2008 |
Filing 97
Joint MOTION FOR ENTRY OF DOCKET CONTROL ORDER AND DISCOVERY ORDER by AOL, LLC., Photobucket.com, Inc., Shutterfly, Inc., CNET Networks, Inc., Yahoo!Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Docket Control Order#4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Discovery Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
|
February 21, 2008 |
Filing 96
ORDER - court adopts #93 dfts proposals for the discovery and docket control orders, and sets Pretrial Conference for 10/22/2009 09:00 AM before Judge Charles Everingham. The parties are ordered to submit agreed docket control and discovery orders to the court conforming the rulings set forth herein within 5 days. Signed by Judge Charles Everingham on 2/21/08. (ch, ) Modified on 2/21/2008 (ch, ).
|
January 29, 2008 |
Filing 95
ORDER granting #92 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Beth L Mitchell terminated as counsel of record for CNET Networks, Inc.. Signed by Judge Charles Everingham on 1/29/08. (ch, )
|
January 28, 2008 |
Filing 94
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Samuel Franklin Baxter on behalf of FotoMedia Technologies, LLC (Baxter, Samuel)
|
January 25, 2008 |
Filing 93
Joint MOTION FOR ENTRY OF DOCKET CONTROL AND DISCOVERY ORDERS by FotoMedia Technologies, LLC, AOL, LLC., America Online, Inc., Photobucket.com, Inc., Shutterfly, Inc., CNET Networks, Inc., Yahoo!Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Docket Control Order#4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Discovery Order)(McKool, Mike)
|
January 25, 2008 |
Filing 92
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Defendant CNET Networks, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion to Withdraw Beth L Mitchell as Counsel of Record in this Matter by CNET Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Order)(Carter, Laura)
|
January 24, 2008 |
Filing 91
ORDER granting #89 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Deadline for submission of a proposed Scheduling Order and proposed Discovery Order is extended until 1/25/08. Signed by Judge Charles Everingham on 1/24/08. (ch, )
|
January 23, 2008 |
Filing 90
NOTICE of Change of Address by Laura K Carter (Carter, Laura)
|
January 22, 2008 |
Filing 89
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Scheduling Order and Proposed Discovery Order by AOL, LLC., Photobucket.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gillam, Harry)
|
January 15, 2008 |
Filing 88
NOTICE of Change of Address by Patrick T Michael (Michael, Patrick)
|
January 9, 2008 |
Filing 87
ORDER - parties shall submit their proposed docket control and discovery orders to the court on January 22, 2007. Deadlines under the local patent rules, the court deems February 5, 2007 to be the date of the initial case management conference.Disclosure of Asserted Claims and Infringement Contentions is due on February 19, 2007.. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 1/9/08. (ch, )
|
January 8, 2008 |
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge T. John Ward and Judge Everingham: Status Conference held on 1/8/2008. Sam Baxter and Gil Gillam in attendance. Claim construction hearing date and trial date were given to parties. Parties are to meet and confer regarding a scheduling order and discovery order. (Court Reporter Susan Simmons.) (shd, )
|
January 8, 2008 |
Filing 86
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge T. John Ward and Judge Charles Everingham: Status Conference held on 1/8/08. Counsel for the parties appeared and were asked if they consented to Judge Everingham. Depending on their answer, they were then given Markman and jury selection dates for the appropriate court. The parties are to meet and confer regarding a scheduling order and discovery order, and the parties have 14 days to submit the proposed orders. The Court further instructed the parties that the time for complying with P.R. 3-1 would be 10 days after the date of the parties filing their proposed orders. Court Adjourned. (Court Reporter Susan Simmons) (jml)
|
January 7, 2008 |
Filing 85
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Frederick Bufe on behalf of Yahoo!Inc. (Bufe, John)
|
January 7, 2008 |
Filing 84
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Blake Charles Erskine on behalf of Shutterfly, Inc. (Erskine, Blake)
|
December 19, 2007 |
Filing 83
SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #66 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, for a More Definite Statement, and Motion to Strike; and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by FotoMedia Technologies, LLC. (McKool, Mike)
|
December 14, 2007 |
Filing 82
NOTICE by CNET Networks, Inc. CNET NETWORKS, INC.S NOTICE OF JOINDER (Michael, Patrick)
|
December 14, 2007 |
Filing 81
NOTICE by Shutterfly, Inc. re #79 Notice (Other), #78 Reply to Response to Motion, #80 Notice (Other) Shutterfly, Inc.'s Notice of Joinder in Yahoo! Inc.'s Reply in Support of Yahoo! Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, for a More Definitive Statement; and Notice of Joinder in Photobucket, Inc.'s Notice of Joinder in Yahoo! Inc.'s Reply in Support of its Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, for A More Definitive Statement, and Response to Fotomedia's Statement with Regard to Photomedia's Argument for Dismissal with Prejudice (Belichick, Joseph)
|
December 14, 2007 |
Filing 80
NOTICE by AOL, LLC. re #78 Reply to Response to Motion, Notice by AOL LLC of Joinder in Yahoo! Inc.'s Reply Brief (Smith, Melissa) Certificate of Service added on 12/17/2007 (mpv, ). Modified on 12/17/2007 (mpv, ).
|
December 14, 2007 |
Filing 79
NOTICE by Photobucket.com, Inc. re #78 Reply to Response to Motion, Notice of Joinder by Photobucket in Yahoo! Inc.'s Reply Brief (Smith, Melissa) Certificate of Service added on 12/17/2007 (mpv, ). Modified on 12/17/2007 (mpv, ).
|
December 14, 2007 |
Filing 78
REPLY to Response to Motion re 71 MOTION for More Definite Statement MOTION to Strike, #66 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, for a More Definite Statement, and Motion to Strike; and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Yahoo!Inc.. (Morico, Paul)
|
December 13, 2007 |
Filing 77
***FILED IN ERROR; PER ATTY; PLEASE IGNORE***AMENDED COMPLAINT against AOL, LLC., Photobucket.com, Inc., Shutterfly, Inc., CNET Networks, Inc., Yahoo!Inc., filed by FotoMedia Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C)(McKool, Mike) Modified on 12/13/2007 (mpv, ).
|
December 13, 2007 |
***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 77, Amended Complaint. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (rml, )
|
December 11, 2007 |
Filing 76
ORDER setting case for status conference. Status Conference set for 1/8/2008 09:45 AM before Judge T. John Ward and Magistrate Judge Everingham. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 12/11/07. (ehs, )
|
December 4, 2007 |
Filing 75
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Indra Neel Chatterjee for FotoMedia Technologies, LLC and AOL, LLC. (FEE PAID) 2-1-3296 (ehs, )
|
December 4, 2007 |
Filing 74
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney William Benjamin Tabler, III for AOL, LLC. and Photobucket.com, Inc. (FEE PAID) 2-1-3296 (ehs, )
|
December 4, 2007 |
Filing 73
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Dieter H Hellmoldt for AOL, LLC. and Photobucket.com, Inc. (FEE PAID) 2-1-3296 (ehs, )
|
December 4, 2007 |
Filing 72
RESPONSE in Opposition re #66 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, for a More Definite Statement, and Motion to Strike; and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by FotoMedia Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McKool, Mike)
|
November 28, 2007 |
Filing 71
MOTION for More Definite Statement, MOTION to Strike by Yahoo!Inc. CONTAINED IN #66 . (mpv, )
|
November 28, 2007 |
Filing 70
NOTICE by Shutterfly, Inc. re #67 Notice (Other), Notice (Other), #69 Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other), #66 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, for a More Definite Statement, and Motion to Strike; and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof, #68 Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other) Shutterfly, Inc.s Notice of Joinder in Yahoo! Inc.s Motion to Dismiss or, in The Alternative, for a More Definite Statement, and Motion to Strike; and Notice of Joinder in Photobucket, Inc.s Joinder and Additional Argument for Dismissal with Prejudice (Belichick, Joseph)
|
November 28, 2007 |
Filing 69
NOTICE by CNET Networks, Inc. re #67 Notice (Other), Notice (Other), #66 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, for a More Definite Statement, and Motion to Strike; and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof --CNET Networks, Inc.'s Notice of Joinder in Yahoo! Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, for a More Definitive Statement and Motion to Strike, and Further Notice of Joinder in Photobucket Inc.'s Joinder and Additional Argument for Dismissal with Prejudice (Mitchell, Beth)
|
November 28, 2007 |
Filing 68
NOTICE by AOL, LLC. re #66 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, for a More Definite Statement, and Motion to Strike; and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof AOL LLC's Notice of Joinder in Yahoo! Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, for a More Definite Statement, and Motion to Strike; and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof; and AOL LLC's Notice of Incorporation by Reference of Previously Filed Notice of Joinder (Gillam, Harry)
|
November 28, 2007 |
Filing 67
NOTICE by Photobucket.com, Inc. re #66 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, for a More Definite Statement, and Motion to Strike; and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof Photobucket, Inc.'s Notice of Joinder in Yahoo! Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, for a More Definite Statement, and Motion to Strike; and Additional Argument for Dismissal with Prejudice (Gillam, Harry)
|
November 28, 2007 |
Filing 66
MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, for a More Definite Statement, and Motion to Strike; and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof by Yahoo!Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Morico, Paul)
|
November 7, 2007 |
Filing 65
ORDER finding as moot #42 Motion to Dismiss, finding as moot [] Motion for More Definite Statement, finding as moot [] Motion to Strike, finding as moot #49 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, granting #63 Motion - deadlines set forth herein . Signed by Judge Charles Everingham on 11/7/07. (ehs, )
|
November 6, 2007 |
Filing 64
AMENDED COMPLAINT against AOL, LLC., Photobucket.com, Inc., Shutterfly, Inc., CNET Networks, Inc., Yahoo!Inc., filed by FotoMedia Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C)(McKool, Mike)
|
November 6, 2007 |
Filing 63
Consent MOTION PLAINTIFFS' UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR A SCHEDULING ORDER RE: AMENDMENT OF COMPLAINT, MOOTING PENDING MOTIONS AND REFILING OF MOTIONS TO DISMISS by FotoMedia Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McKool, Mike)
|
November 1, 2007 |
Filing 62
SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #42 MOTION to Dismiss Photobucket Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, For a More Definite Statement, and Motion to Strike; and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by FotoMedia Technologies, LLC. (McKool, Mike)
|
November 1, 2007 |
Filing 61
NOTICE OF JOINDER by AOL, LLC. re #42 MOTION to Dismiss Photobucket Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, For a More Definite Statement, and Motion to Strike; and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof AOL LLC's Notice of Joinder in Photobucket, Inc.'s Reply to Fotomedia's Opposition to its Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, for a More Definite Statement, and Motion to Strike; and Notice of Joinder in Yahoo! Inc.'s Notice of Adoption of and Joinder in Photobucket Inc.'s Reply to Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, for a More Definite Statement, and Motion to Strike (Gillam, Harry) Modified on 11/2/2007 (sm, ).
|
October 22, 2007 |
Filing 60
NOTICE by CNET Networks, Inc. re #58 Notice (Other), #57 Reply to Response to Motion, CNET Networks, Inc.'s Notice of Joinder in Photobucket, Inc.'s Reply to Fotomedia's Opposition to its Motion to Dismiss, or in the alternative, for a More Definitive Statement, and Motion to Strike; and Notice of Joinder in Yahoo! Inc.'s Adoption of and Joinder in Photobucket, Inc.'s Reply to Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss or, in the alternative, for a More Definitive Statement, and Motion to Strike (Mitchell, Beth)
|
October 22, 2007 |
Filing 59
NOTICE by Shutterfly, Inc. re #57 Reply to Response to Motion, Shutterfly, Inc.'s Notice of Joinder in Photobucket, Inc.'s Reply to Fotomedia's Opposition to Its Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, for a More Definitive Statement, and Motion to Strike; and Notice of Joinder in Yahoo! Inc.'s Adoption of and Joinder in Photobucket, Inc.'s Reply to Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, for a More Definitive Statement, and Motion to Strike (Belichick, Joseph)
|
October 22, 2007 |
Filing 58
NOTICE by Yahoo!Inc. re #57 Reply to Response to Motion, Adoption of and Joinder (Jones, Michael)
|
October 22, 2007 |
Filing 57
REPLY to Response to Motion re #42 MOTION to Dismiss Photobucket Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, For a More Definite Statement, and Motion to Strike; and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof Photobucket Inc.'s Reply to Fotomedia's Opposition to its Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, For a More Definite Statement, and Motion to Strike filed by Photobucket.com, Inc.. (Gillam, Harry)
|
October 9, 2007 |
Filing 56
ORDER granting #53 Motion to Dismiss. America Online, Inc is hereby dismissed without prejudice to re-filing of the same . Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 10/9/07. (ch, )
|
October 5, 2007 |
Filing 55
ORDER withdrawing #53 Motion to Dismiss, granting #54 Motion to Withdraw . Signed by Judge Charles Everingham on 10/5/07. (ehs, )
|
October 4, 2007 |
Filing 54
MOTION to Withdraw #49 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction America Online, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction Pursuant to FRCP 12(B)(2) and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof Agreed Motion to Withdraw America Online, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(2) by America Online, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gillam, Harry)
|
October 4, 2007 |
Filing 53
Consent MOTION to Dismiss AMERICA ONLINE, INC. WITHOUT PREJUDICE by FotoMedia Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McKool, Mike)
|
October 1, 2007 |
Filing 52
RESPONSE in Opposition re #42 MOTION to Dismiss Photobucket Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, For a More Definite Statement, and Motion to Strike; and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by FotoMedia Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McKool, Mike)
|
September 25, 2007 |
Filing 51
ORDER granting #50 Agreed Motion to Extend Deadlines to file a Response to Photobucket's Motion to Dismiss and Dft Replies thereto. The deadlines are extended as follows herein . Signed by Judge Charles Everingham on 9/25/07. (ch, )
|
September 24, 2007 |
Filing 50
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #42 MOTION to Dismiss Photobucket Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, For a More Definite Statement, and Motion to Strike; and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof by FotoMedia Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McKool, Mike)
|
September 17, 2007 |
Filing 49
***WITHDRAWN PER ORDER #55 *** MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction America Online, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction Pursuant to FRCP 12(B)(2) and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof by America Online, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Katherine E. Wychulis#2 Text of Proposed Order)(Gillam, Harry) Modified on 10/5/2007 (ehs, ).
|
September 17, 2007 |
Filing 48
NOTICE by AOL, LLC. re #42 MOTION to Dismiss Photobucket Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, For a More Definite Statement, and Motion to Strike; and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof AOL LLC's Notice of Joinder in Photobucket's Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, for a More Definite Statement, and Motion to Strike; and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof (Gillam, Harry)
|
September 10, 2007 |
Filing 47
***REPLACES #45***NOTICE by Yahoo!Inc. re #42 MOTION to Dismiss Photobucket Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, For a More Definite Statement, and Motion to Strike; and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof (Notice of Adoption and Joinder in Photobucket Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, for a More Definitive Statement, and Motion to Strike) (Partridge, Scott) Modified on 9/10/2007 (mpv, ).
|
September 10, 2007 |
Filing 46
***REPLACES #44***NOTICE by CNET Networks, Inc. NOTICE OF JOINDER IN PHOTOBUCKET INC.'S #45 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM PURSUANT TO FRCP 12(B)(6) OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT, AND MOTION TO STRIKE (Michael, Patrick) Modified on 9/10/2007 (mpv, ). Modified on 9/10/2007 (mpv, ).
|
September 10, 2007 |
NOTICE of Deficiency regarding #44 the MOTION for Joinder CNET NETWORKS, INC.'S NOTICE OF JOINDER IN PHOTOBUCKET INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM PURSUANT TO FRCP 12(B)(6) OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT, AND MOTION TO STRIK E by CNET Networks, Inc.. submitted Docketed Incorrectly as a Motion, attorney to refile correctly as a Notice. Correction should be made by one business day. (mpv, )
|
September 10, 2007 |
NOTICE of Deficiency regarding #45 the MOTION for Joinder in Photobucket Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim or in the alternative Motion for a more definite statement and Motion to Strike by Yahoo!Inc.. submitted Docketed Incorrectly as a Motion, attorney to refile as a Notice. Correction should be made by one business day. (mpv, )
|
September 10, 2007 |
NOTICE of Deficiency regarding #44 the MOTION for Joinder CNET NETWORKS, INC.'S NOTICE OF JOINDER IN PHOTOBUCKET INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM PURSUANT TO FRCP 12(B)(6) OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT, AND MOTION TO STRIK E by CNET Networks, Inc.. submitted Docketed Incorrectly as a Motion, attorney to refile correctly as a Notice. Correction should be made by one business day. (mpv, )
|
September 10, 2007 |
NOTICE of Deficiency regarding #45 the MOTION for Joinder in Photobucket Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim or in the alternative Motion for a more definite statement and Motion to Strike by Yahoo!Inc.. submitted Docketed Incorrectly as a Motion, attorney to refile as a Notice. Correction should be made by one business day. (mpv, )
|
September 7, 2007 |
MOTION for More Definite Statement, MOTION to Strike CONTAINED IN #42 by Photobucket.com, Inc.. (mpv, )
|
September 7, 2007 |
MOTION for More Definite Statement, MOTION to Strike CONTAINED IN # 42 by Photobucket.com, Inc.. (mpv, )
|
September 7, 2007 |
Filing 45
***FILED IN ERROR; DOCKETED INCORRECTLY; PLEASE IGNORE*** MOTION for Joinder in Photobucket Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim or in the alternative Motion for a more definite statement and Motion to Strike by Yahoo!Inc.. (Partridge, Scott) Modified on 9/10/2007 (mpv, ).
|
September 7, 2007 |
Filing 44
***FILED IN ERROR; DOCKETED INCORRECTLY; PLEASE IGNORE*** MOTION for Joinder CNET NETWORKS, INC.'S NOTICE OF JOINDER IN PHOTOBUCKET INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM PURSUANT TO FRCP 12(B)(6) OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT, AND MOTION TO STRIKE by CNET Networks, Inc.. (Michael, Patrick) Modified on 9/10/2007 (mpv, ).
|
September 7, 2007 |
Filing 43
NOTICE by Shutterfly, Inc. re #42 MOTION to Dismiss Photobucket Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, For a More Definite Statement, and Motion to Strike; and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof Shutterfly, Inc.'s Notice of Joinder in Photobucket, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, for a More Definitive Statement, and Motion to Strike (Belichick, Joseph)
|
September 7, 2007 |
Filing 42
MOTION to Dismiss Photobucket Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, For a More Definite Statement, and Motion to Strike; and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof by Photobucket.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gillam, Harry)
|
September 7, 2007 |
Filing 41
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Edwin Jones on behalf of Yahoo!Inc. (Jones, Michael)
|
September 7, 2007 |
Filing 40
ORDER granting #39 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. AOL LLC and America Online, Inc. deadline is extended to 9/17/07 . Signed by Judge Charles Everingham on 9/7/07. (ch, )
|
September 7, 2007 |
Answer Due Deadline Updated for AOL, LLC. to 9/17/2007; America Online, Inc. to 9/17/2007. (ch, )
|
September 6, 2007 |
Filing 39
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time for AOL LLC and America Online, Inc. to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by AOL, LLC., America Online, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gillam, Harry)
|
August 28, 2007 |
Filing 37
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Patrick T Michael for CNET Networks, Inc. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 2-1-2947. (ch, )
|
August 27, 2007 |
Filing 36
ORDER granting #35 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Deft CNET Networks deadline to file answer extended to 9/7/07 . Signed by Judge Charles Everingham on 8/27/07. (ehs, )
|
August 27, 2007 |
Answer Due Deadline Updated for CNET Networks, Inc. to 9/7/2007. (ehs, )
|
August 24, 2007 |
Filing 35
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Unopposed Motion to Extend the Deadline to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by CNET Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Lavender, G)
|
August 24, 2007 |
Filing 34
ORDER granting #29 Motion for Extension of Time to File Respond to ptlf's complaint. Deadline for Shutterfly set to 9/7/2007. Signed by Judge Charles Everingham on 8/24/07. (ehs, )
|
August 24, 2007 |
Filing 33
ORDER granting #28 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Deadline extended for America OnLine Inc to 9/7/07 . Signed by Judge Charles Everingham on 8/24/07. (ehs, )
|
August 24, 2007 |
Filing 32
ORDER granting #27 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Deadline extended to 9/7/07 for deft PhotoBucket.Com . Signed by Judge Charles Everingham on 8/24/07. (ehs, )
|
August 24, 2007 |
Filing 31
Answer Due Deadline Updated for AOL, LLC. to 9/7/2007. (ehs, )
|
August 24, 2007 |
Filing 30
ORDER granting #26 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Deadline extended to 9/7/07 for deft AOL LLC . Signed by Judge Charles Everingham on 8/24/07. (ehs, )
|
August 24, 2007 |
Answer Due Deadline Updated for America Online, Inc. to 9/7/2007; Photobucket.com, Inc. to 9/7/2007; Shutterfly, Inc. to 9/7/2007. (ehs, )
|
August 23, 2007 |
Filing 29
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, Agreed Motion to Extend Deadline to Respond to Complaint by Shutterfly, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Woo, Darryl)
|
August 23, 2007 |
Filing 28
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time for America Online, Inc. to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by America Online, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gillam, Harry)
|
August 22, 2007 |
Filing 27
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time for Photobucket.com, Inc. to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Photobucket.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gillam, Harry)
|
August 22, 2007 |
Filing 26
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time for AOL LLC to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by AOL, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gillam, Harry)
|
August 21, 2007 |
Filing 25
ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Deadline for Yahoo! Inc extended to 9/7/07 . Signed by Judge Charles Everingham on 8/21/07. (ehs, )
|
August 21, 2007 |
Filing 19
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Paul R Morico on behalf of Yahoo!Inc. (Morico, Paul)
|
August 21, 2007 |
Filing 18
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lisa Catherine Kelly on behalf of Yahoo!Inc. (Kelly, Lisa)
|
August 21, 2007 |
Answer Due Deadline Updated for Yahoo!Inc. to 9/7/2007. (ehs, )
|
August 20, 2007 |
Filing 17
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Yahoo!Inc. (Partridge, Scott)
|
August 20, 2007 |
Filing 16
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, or otherwise respond by Yahoo!Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Partridge, Scott)
|
August 17, 2007 |
Filing 38
E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by FotoMedia Technologies, LLC. CNET Networks, Inc. served on 6/29/2007, answer due 9/7/2007. (ehs, )
|
August 17, 2007 |
Filing 24
E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by FotoMedia Technologies, LLC. Photobucket.com, Inc. served on 6/28/2007, answer due 8/24/2007. (ehs, )
|
August 17, 2007 |
Filing 23
E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by FotoMedia Technologies, LLC. AOL, LLC. served on 6/28/2007, answer due 8/24/2007. (ehs, )
|
August 17, 2007 |
Filing 22
E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by FotoMedia Technologies, LLC. America Online, Inc. served on 6/28/2007, answer due 8/24/2007. (ehs, )
|
August 17, 2007 |
Filing 21
E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by FotoMedia Technologies, LLC. Shutterfly, Inc. served on 6/29/2007, answer due 8/24/2007. (ehs, )
|
August 17, 2007 |
Filing 20
E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by FotoMedia Technologies, LLC. Yahoo!Inc. served on 7/13/2007, answer due 8/24/2007. (ehs, )
|
August 9, 2007 |
Filing 15
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Laura K Carter for CNET Networks, Inc.(APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 2-1-2886. (ch, )
|
August 9, 2007 |
Filing 14
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Beth L Mitchell for CNET Networks, Inc..(APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 2-1-2886 (ch, )
|
July 19, 2007 |
Filing 13
ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Yahoo! Inc. AOL LLC's America Online, In., Photobucket.com Inc. deadline is extended to 8/24/07 . Signed by Judge Charles Everingham on 7/19/07. (ch, )
|
July 19, 2007 |
Filing 12
ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Shutterfly deadline is extended to 8/24/07 . Signed by Judge Charles Everingham on 7/19/07. (ch, )
|
July 19, 2007 |
Filing 11
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ivan Wang on behalf of FotoMedia Technologies, LLC (Wang, Ivan)
|
July 19, 2007 |
Filing 10
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Travis Gordon White on behalf of FotoMedia Technologies, LLC (White, Travis)
|
July 19, 2007 |
Filing 9
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lewis T LeClair on behalf of FotoMedia Technologies, LLC (LeClair, Lewis)
|
July 19, 2007 |
Filing 8
***REPLACES #7***NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Shumaker on behalf of FotoMedia Technologies, LLC (Shumaker, John) Modified on 7/20/2007 (mpv, ).
|
July 19, 2007 |
Filing 7
***FILED IN ERROR.SEE CORRECTED DOCUMENT #8 ***NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Shumaker on behalf of FotoMedia Technologies, LLC (Shumaker, John) Modified on 7/19/2007 (ch, ).
|
July 19, 2007 |
Answer Due Deadline Updated for AOL, LLC. to 8/24/2007; America Online, Inc. to 8/24/2007; Photobucket.com, Inc. to 8/24/2007; CNET Networks, Inc. to 8/24/2007; Yahoo!Inc. to 8/24/2007. (ch, )
|
July 19, 2007 |
Answer Due Deadline Updated for Shutterfly, Inc. to 8/24/2007. (ch, )
|
July 18, 2007 |
Filing 6
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer /Response to Complaint by Shutterfly, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Woo, Darryl)
|
July 18, 2007 |
Filing 5
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, JOINT MOTION TO EXTEND YAHOO!'S, AOL'S PHOTOBUCKET.COM'S AND CNET NETWORKS' DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by FotoMedia Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McKool, Mike)
|
June 27, 2007 |
Filing 4
E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to AOL, LLC., America Online, Inc., Photobucket.com, Inc., Shutterfly, Inc., CNET Networks, Inc., Yahoo!Inc.. (ch, )
|
June 19, 2007 |
Filing 3
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by FotoMedia Technologies, LLC identifying Scenera Research LLC as Corporate Parent. (McKool, Mike)
|
June 19, 2007 |
Filing 2
NOTICE by FotoMedia Technologies, LLC AO 120 Form (McKool, Mike)
|
June 19, 2007 |
Filing 1
COMPLAINT against AOL, LLC., America Online, Inc., Photobucket.com, Inc., Shutterfly, Inc., CNET Networks, Inc., Yahoo!Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 1164278.), filed by FotoMedia Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C#4 Civil Cover Sheet)(McKool, Mike)
|
June 19, 2007 |
Filing 1
COMPLAINT against AOL, LLC., America Online, Inc., Photobucket.com, Inc., Shutterfly, Inc., CNET Networks, Inc., Yahoo!Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 1164278.), filed by FotoMedia Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Civil Cover Sheet)(McKool, Mike)
|