Beneficial Innovations, Inc. v. Blockdot, Inc. et al Featured Case

Plaintiff alleges that defendants have infringed US Patent No. 6,712,702 covering a method and system for playing games on a network.

Plaintiff: Beneficial Innovations, Inc.
Defendant: Blockdot, Inc., CareerBuilder, LLC, Cnet Networks, Inc., Digg, Inc., Ebaum's World, Inc., Jabez Networks, Inc., The New York Times Company, The Washington Post Company, The Weather Channel Interactive, Inc. and Washingtonpost.Newsweek Interactive Company, LLC
Counter Claimant: Digg, Inc., Cnet Networks, Inc., Jabez Networks, Inc. and The New York Times Company
Counter Defendant: Beneficial Innovations, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2007cv00263
Filed: June 20, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Marshall Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: Charles Everingham
Presiding Judge: T. John Ward
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2010. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 279 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Invalidity Contentions by The New York Times Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rosenbloom, Brian)
August 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 278 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 274 MOTION for Summary Judgment OF NON-INFRINGEMENT OF CLAIM 1 OF THE 366 PATENT by Beneficial Innovations, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Adams, Julien)
August 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 277 RESPONSE in Opposition re 273 MOTION for Reconsideration re 267 Memorandum & Opinion,, Motion for Clarification MOTION for Reconsideration re 267 Memorandum & Opinion,, Motion for Clarification filed by The New York Times Company. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit B Rosenbloom, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Rosenbloom, Brian)
August 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 276 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Sharon L Davis for The New York Times Company. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-1-5540) (ehs, )
August 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 275 AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER - Discovery due by 10/22/2010., Expert Witness List due by 8/23/2010., Motions due by 1/7/2011., Pretrial Order due by 1/14/2011., Jury Selection set for 2/7/2011 09:00AM before Judge T. John Ward., Pretrial Conference set for 1/31/2011 01:30 PM in Mag Ctrm (Marshall) before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham.), Motions terminated: 272 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Amended Docket Control Order filed by The New York Times Company.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 8/9/10. (ehs, )
August 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 274 MOTION for Summary Judgment OF NON-INFRINGEMENT OF CLAIM 1 OF THE 366 PATENT by The New York Times Company. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit B Rosenbloom Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 1 to B Rosenbloom Declaration, # 3 Exhibit 2 to B Rosenbloom Declaration, # 4 Affidavit of K Meddahi, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Rosenbloom, Brian)
July 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 273 MOTION for Reconsideration re 267 Memorandum & Opinion,, Motion for Clarification by Beneficial Innovations, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Julien Adams, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Adams, Julien) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/3/2010: # 5 Text of Proposed Order) (sm, ).
July 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 272 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Amended Docket Control Order by The New York Times Company. (Attachments: # 1 Amended Docket Control Order)(Edwards, Oliver)
July 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 271 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham: Hotline Conference held on 7/8/2010.(delat)
June 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 270 NOTICE of Disclosure by The New York Times Company THIRD SUPPLEMENTAL INITIAL DISCLOSURE (Rosenbloom, Brian)
June 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 269 AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER - Discovery due by 10/22/2010., Motions in limine due by 1/7/2011., Proposed Pretrial Order due by 1/14/2011., Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/31/2011 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham., Jury Selection set for 2/7/2011 09:00AM before Judge T. John Ward. Mediation deadline is 11/30/2010. All other deadlines are set forth herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/10/2010. (ch, )
June 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 268 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order by The New York Times Company. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Amended Docket Control Order)(Rosenbloom, Brian)
June 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 267 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER - RE: Dft New York Time Company's motion for reconsiderations of the courts claim construction order and Dft Google Inc and YouTube LLC motion on same. [See Dkt. No. 258 in case number 207-CV-263 and Dkt. No. 254 in case number 207-CV-555]. The two pending motions contain substantially the same arguments and will be treated as one motion for the purposes of this order. Plaintiff Beneficial Innovations, Inc. (Beneficial) opposes Defendants request. For the following reasons, the Court GRANTS Defendants motion. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 6/3/2010. (ch, )
June 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 266 ORDER - This case and Beneficial Innovations Inc v AOL LLC et al 2:07-cv-555 are consolidated for purposes of trial. Both parties will be tried together in February 2011. Jury Selection set for 2/7/2011 09:00AM before Judge T. John Ward., Pretrial Conference set for 1/31/2011 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham. Within seven (7) days, the parties shall submit an amended docket control order that conforms to the dates listed above. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/2/2010. (ch, )
May 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 265 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 258 MOTION for Reconsideration re 253 Memorandum & Opinion,, MOTION for Reconsideration re 253 Memorandum & Opinion,, filed by Beneficial Innovations, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Julien Adams, # 2 Exhibit 1)(Adams, Julien)
May 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 264 ORDER granting 251 Opposed MOTION to Amend/Correct infringement contentions filed by Beneficial Innovations, Inc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 5/27/10. (ehs, )
May 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 263 REPLY to Response to Motion re 258 MOTION for Reconsideration re 253 Memorandum & Opinion,, MOTION for Reconsideration re 253 Memorandum & Opinion,, filed by The New York Times Company. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit)(Rosenbloom, Brian)
May 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 262 RESPONSE in Opposition re 258 MOTION for Reconsideration re 253 Memorandum & Opinion,, MOTION for Reconsideration re 253 Memorandum & Opinion,, filed by Beneficial Innovations, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Adams, Julien)
May 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 261 NOTICE by The New York Times Company Filing Notice of Second Supplemental Initial Disclosure (Rosenbloom, Brian)
April 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 260 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 251 Opposed MOTION to Amend/Correct infringement contentions filed by The New York Times Company. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit B Rosenbloom Second, # 2 Exhibit 1)(Rosenbloom, Brian)
April 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 259 ORDER granting 257 Motion to Dismiss Defendant Erics Universe, Inc. should be dismissed without prejudice, with all attorneys fees and costs of court being borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 4/22/10. (ehs, )
April 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 258 MOTION for Reconsideration re 253 Memorandum & Opinion,, by The New York Times Company. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Brian Rosenbloom, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Rosenbloom, Brian)
April 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 257 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Eric's Universe (formerly Ebaum's World) by Beneficial Innovations, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Adams, Julien)
April 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 256 ORDER granting 254 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jessica Lea Hannah terminated as counsel for Beneficial Innovations. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 4/13/10. (ehs, )
April 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 255 REPLY to Response to Motion re 251 Opposed MOTION to Amend/Correct infringement contentions filed by Beneficial Innovations, Inc.. (Adams, Julien)
April 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 254 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Jessica L. Hannah by Beneficial Innovations, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
April 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 253 MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER - The Court adopts the constructions set forth in this opinion for the disputed terms of the 366 and 702 patents. The parties are ordered that they may not refer, directly or indirectly, to each others claim construction positions in the presence of the jury. Likewise, the parties are ordered to refrain from mentioning any portion of this opinion, other than the actual definitions adopted by the Court, in the presence of the jury. Any reference to claim construction proceedings is limited to informing the jury of the definitions adopted by the Court. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 4/12/10. (ehs, )
April 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 252 RESPONSE to Motion re 251 Opposed MOTION to Amend/Correct infringement contentions filed by The New York Times Company. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Brian Rosenbloom, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Rosenbloom, Brian)
March 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 251 Opposed MOTION to Amend/Correct infringement contentions by Beneficial Innovations, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Julien Adams, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Text of Proposed Order)(Adams, Julien)
February 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 250 ORDER granting 174 Motion for Extension regarding Additional Disclosures of Defendant Erics Universe, Inc.. Defendant Erics Universe, Inc. shall have up to and including June 5, 2009 to serve its Additional Disclosures, as outlined in paragraph 2 of the Courts Discovery Order (Dkt. No. 110).. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 2/25/10. (ehs, )
February 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 249 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 2/2/10 Claim Construction Hearing before Judge T. John Ward. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Susan Simmons,Telephone number: 903/935-3868. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 3/22/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/1/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/1/2010. (lss, )
February 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 248 NOTICE by The New York Times Company of Filing Letter Brief (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Rosenbloom, Brian)
February 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 247 ORDER - Defendants will be allowed to file a 1-page letter response to Plaintiffs supplemental letter on programmatic elements provided to the Court on February 3, 2010 (See Dkt. No. 245.) Such a response, if any, must be filed by Friday, February 19, 2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 2/9/10. (ehs, )
February 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 246 NOTICE by Beneficial Innovations, Inc. re 244 Markman Hearing Plaintiff's Notice of Filing Presentation Slides (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Adams, Julien)
February 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 245 NOTICE by Beneficial Innovations, Inc. OF FILING LETTER BRIEF (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Bunt, Robert)
February 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 244 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge T. John Ward: Markman Hearing held on 2/2/2010. (Court Reporter Susan Simmons.) (bga, )
January 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 243 ORDER denying 197 Motion to Consolidate Cases. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 1/12/10. (ehs, )
January 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 242 NOTICE of Hearing:Claim Construction Hearing RESET to 2/2/2010 at 8:30 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge T. John Ward. (shd, )
December 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 241 JOINT CLAIM CONSTRUCTION CHART filed by Beneficial Innovations, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Adams, Julien)
December 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 240 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ada Elene Brown on behalf of The New York Times Company (Brown, Ada)
December 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 239 REPLY to 218 Claim Construction Brief, filed by Beneficial Innovations, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 17, # 2 Exhibit 18, # 3 Exhibit 19)(Adams, Julien)
December 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 238 ORDER granting 237 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: Claim Construction Brief. Responses due by 12/18/2009. Page limits are an additional five pages for a total of fifteen. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 12/16/09. (ch, )
December 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 237 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 228 Reply to Claim Construction Brief,,, 218 Claim Construction Brief,, by Beneficial Innovations, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Adams, Julien)
December 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 236 NOTICE of Disclosure by The New York Times Company Supplemental Initial (Rosenbloom, Brian)
December 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 235 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jessica Lea Hannah on behalf of Beneficial Innovations, Inc. (Hannah, Jessica)
December 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 234 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Oliver Edwards for The New York Times Company.(APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-1-5069 (ch, )
November 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 233 ORDER granting 226 Motion to Dismiss. CBS Interactive are hereby dismissed with prejudice. The parties shall bear their own costs and attorneys fees. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 11/30/09. (ehs, )
November 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 232 ORDER granting 225 Motion to Dismiss. Jabez are herebydismissed with prejudice. The parties shall bear their own costs and attorneys fees. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 11/30/09. (ehs, )
November 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 231 ORDER granting 224 Motion to Dismiss Defendant Digg Inc. are hereby dismissed with prejudice. All costs are assessed against the party who incurred them. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 11/30/09. (ehs, )
November 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 230 ORDER granting 227 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 11/24/09. (ehs, )
November 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 229 NOTICE by The New York Times Company re 208 Reply to Response to Motion Suppl Submission in Support of Motion to Consolidate (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit E, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rosenbloom, Brian)
November 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 228 REPLY to 218 Claim Construction Brief,, filed by The New York Times Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3 part a, # 4 Exhibit 3 part b, # 5 Exhibit 3 part c, # 6 Exhibit 3 part d, # 7 Exhibit 3 part e, # 8 Exhibit 3 part f, # 9 Exhibit 3 part g, # 10 Exhibit 3 part h, # 11 Exhibit 3 part i, # 12 Exhibit 3 part j, # 13 Exhibit 3 part k, # 14 Exhibit 3 part l, # 15 Exhibit 3 part m, # 16 Exhibit 3 part n, # 17 Exhibit 3 part o, # 18 Exhibit 3 part p, # 19 Exhibit 4, # 20 Exhibit 5, # 21 Exhibit 6, # 22 Exhibit 7, # 23 Exhibit 8, # 24 Exhibit 9, # 25 Exhibit 10, # 26 Exhibit 11, # 27 Exhibit 12, # 28 Exhibit 13, # 29 Exhibit 14, # 30 Exhibit 15, # 31 Exhibit 16)(Rosenbloom, Brian)
November 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 227 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by The New York Times Company. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Rosenbloom, Brian)
November 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 226 Joint MOTION to Dismiss CNET Networks, Inc. by Beneficial Innovations, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Adams, Julien)
November 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 225 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Jabez, Inc. by Beneficial Innovations, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Adams, Julien)
November 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 224 ***REPLACES # 223 ***Joint MOTION to Dismiss Digg, Inc. by Beneficial Innovations, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Adams, Julien) Modified on 11/9/2009 (ch, ).
November 6, 2009 Opinion or Order ***FILED IN ERROR. FILED UNDER WRONG EVENT Document # 223, Stipulation of Dismiss. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
November 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 223 ***FILED IN ERROR. FILED UNDER WRONG EVENT. PLEASE IGNORE.***STIPULATION of Dismissal of Digg, Inc. by Beneficial Innovations, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Adams, Julien) Modified on 11/6/2009 (ch, ).
November 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 222 ORDER granting 220 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Submission in Support of Motion to Consolidate Cases. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 11/3/09. (ehs, )
November 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 221 ORDER granting 219 Motion to Amend docket control order. Parties to inform the Court if there are no disputes concerning privilegeddocuments due on November 6, 2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 11/3/09. (ehs, )
October 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 220 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Submission In Support of Motion to Consolidate Cases by The New York Times Company, Eric's Universe Inc, Cnet Networks, Inc., Digg, Inc., Jabez Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rosenbloom, Brian)
October 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 219 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order by The New York Times Company, Beneficial Innovations, Inc., Eric's Universe Inc, Cnet Networks, Inc., Digg, Inc., Jabez Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rosenbloom, Brian)
October 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 218 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Beneficial Innovations, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Affidavit of Kevin Almeroth Part 1, # 18 Affidavit of Kevin Almeroth Part 2, # 19 Affidavit of Kevin Almeroth Part 3, # 20 Affidavit of Kevin Almeroth Part 4)(Adams, Julien)
October 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 217 ORDER granting 214 Motion to Amend docket control order. Deadline in the Courts Docket Control Order for the Parties in the present action to inform the Court if there are no disputes concerning privileged documents or information is extended to and including October 30, 2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 10/5/09. (ehs, )
October 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 216 ORDER granting 213 Motion to Amend docket control order. The deadline in the Court's Docket Control Order for the Parties in the present action to comply with P.R. 4-3(d) is extended to and including September 25,2009, to comply with P.R. 4-4 insofar as it relates to "depositions with respect to claim construction of...experts" is extended to and including November 4, 2009, to comply with P.R. 4-5(a) is extended to and including October 16,2009, and to comply with P.R. 4-5(b) is extended to and including November 20,2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 10/5/09. (ehs, )
October 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 215 ORDER - granting 207 Joint Stipulation of Dismissal. All claims asserted between plaintiff and dft CareerBuilder are hereby dismissed with prejudice. Each party shall bear its own costs and attorney fees. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 10/1/09. (ch, )
October 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 214 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 111 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,,, Docket Control Order by The New York Times Company. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Rosenbloom, Brian)
October 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 213 **REPLACES # 212 ***Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 111 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,,, Docket Control Order by The New York Times Company. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Rosenbloom, Brian) Modified on 10/1/2009 (ch, ).
October 1, 2009 Opinion or Order ***FILED IN ERROR. NOT IN PDF SEARCHABLE FORMAT Document # 212, Joint Motion to Amend/Correct. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
October 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 212 ***FILED IN ERROR. NOT IN PDF SEARCHABLE FORMAT. PLEASE IGNORE.***Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 111 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,,, Docket Control Order by The New York Times Company. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Rosenbloom, Brian) Modified on 10/1/2009 (ch, ).
September 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 211 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 197 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Beneficial Innovations, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Julien Adams)(Adams, Julien)
September 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 210 NOTICE by The New York Times Company re 209 Notice (Other) Supplement to the Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement (Rosenbloom, Brian)
September 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 209 NOTICE by Digg, Inc. Filing of Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Bartow, D.)
September 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 208 REPLY to Response to Motion re 197 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by The New York Times Company, Eric's Universe Inc, Cnet Networks, Inc., Digg, Inc., Jabez Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Baxter, Samuel)
September 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 207 STIPULATION of Dismissal of CareerBuilder, LLC by Beneficial Innovations, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Adams, Julien)
September 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 206 ORDER granting 205 Motion extend deadlines. Deadline for the parties to comply with P.R. 4-3(d) is extended up to and including September 23, 2009. deadline for the parties to comply with the remaining provisions of P.R.4-3 is extended up to and including September 18, 2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 9/15/09. (ehs, )
September 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 205 Joint MOTION to Extend Deadlines by The New York Times Company, Beneficial Innovations, Inc., Eric's Universe Inc, CareerBuilder, LLC, Cnet Networks, Inc., Digg, Inc., Jabez Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeVasto, Diane)
September 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORDER granting 203 Motion to Extend the P.R. 4-3 Deadline. Deadline extended to 9/16/09. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 9/9/09. (ehs, )
September 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 203 Joint MOTION to Extend P.R. 4-3 Deadline by The New York Times Company, Beneficial Innovations, Inc., Eric's Universe Inc, CareerBuilder, LLC, Cnet Networks, Inc., Digg, Inc., Jabez Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeVasto, Diane)
September 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 202 RESPONSE in Opposition re 197 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Beneficial Innovations, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Adams, Julien)
September 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER granting 200 Motion to Amend docket control order. The deadline in the Courts Docket Control Order for the Parties in the present action to inform the Court if there are no disputes concerning privileged documents or information is extended to and including September 30, 2009. No other deadlines in the Courts Docket Control Order in either the present case or the AOL action are affected by this Order.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 9/3/09. (ehs, )
September 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 200 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 192 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct,, regarding deadline to inform the Court if there are no disputes concerning privileged documents or information by The New York Times Company, Beneficial Innovations, Inc., Eric's Universe Inc, CareerBuilder, LLC, Cnet Networks, Inc., Digg, Inc., Jabez Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeVasto, Diane)
August 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ORDER granting 198 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 197 MOTION to Consolidate Cases Responses due by 9/4/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 8/24/09. (ch, )
August 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 198 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 197 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Beneficial Innovations, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Adams, Julien)
August 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 197 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by The New York Times Company, Eric's Universe Inc, CareerBuilder, LLC, Cnet Networks, Inc., Digg, Inc., Jabez Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(DeVasto, Diane)
August 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 196 AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 8/5/09. (ch, )
July 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 195 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by The New York Times Company, Beneficial Innovations, Inc., Eric's Universe Inc, CareerBuilder, LLC, Cnet Networks, Inc., Digg, Inc., Jabez Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeVasto, Diane)
July 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER granting 193 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Nancy Claire Abernathy terminated as counsel for Beneficial Innovations. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/28/09. (ehs, )
July 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 193 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney N. Claire Abernathy by Beneficial Innovations, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
July 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER granting 191 Motion to Amend docket control order. Deadlines in the Courts Docket Control Order for the Parties in the present action to inform the Court if there are no disputes concerning privileged documents or information is extended to August 31, 2009, to comply with P.R. 4-3 is extended to September 9, 2009, to comply with P.R. 4-4 is extended to September 21, 2009, to comply with P.R. 4-5(a) is extended to October 2, 2009, to comply with P.R. 4-5(b) is extended to November 16, 2009, to comply with P.R. 4-5(c) is extended to December 16, 2009, and to comply with P.R. 4- 5(d) is extended to December 23, 2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/21/09. (ehs, )
July 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 191 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 111 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,,, by The New York Times Company, Beneficial Innovations, Inc., CareerBuilder, LLC, Cnet Networks, Inc., Digg, Inc., Jabez Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeVasto, Diane)
June 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 190 NOTICE of Disclosure by Beneficial Innovations, Inc. of Beneficial Innovations Privilege Log (Adams, Julien)
June 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 189 NOTICE of Disclosure by Digg, Inc.(a Delaware Corporation) Compliance with Privilege Log Obligation (Bartow, D.)
June 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 188 NOTICE by CareerBuilder, LLC of Compliance with Discovery Order regarding Service of Privilege Log (DeVasto, Diane)
June 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 187 NOTICE by The New York Times Company of Compliance with Discovery Order regarding Service of Privilege Log (Baxter, Samuel)
June 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 186 NOTICE of Disclosure by Jabez Networks, Inc. Compliance with Privilege Log Obligation (Geiszler, Steven)
June 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 185 NOTICE of Disclosure by Cnet Networks, Inc. Compliance with Privilege Log Obligation (Geiszler, Steven)
June 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ORDER granting 183 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Diane DeVasto and Michael Edwin Jones terminated as counsel for Eric's Universe, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/8/09. (ch, )
June 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 183 Consent MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of Diane DeVasto, Michael Jones, and Potter Minton, P.C. by Eric's Universe Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeVasto, Diane)
June 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 182 NOTICE by The New York Times Company NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH DISCOVERY ORDER PARAGRAPH 2(b) (Baxter, Samuel)
June 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 181 NOTICE of Disclosure by Digg, Inc.(a Delaware Corporation) regarding Additional Disclosures (Bartow, D.)
June 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER granting 177 Motion for Discovery. ORDERED that, except for expert witness testimony, all discovery conducted in either the present action or Beneficial Innovations v. AOL LLC et al., Civil Action No. 2:07cv555 (TJW/DE) (the AOL Action), shall be treated as conducted in both the present action and the AOL Action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/1/09. (ehs, )
May 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 179 NOTICE of Disclosure by Jabez Networks, Inc.(a Tennessee Corporation) regarding Additional Disclosures (Itchon, Edric)
May 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 178 NOTICE of Disclosure by Beneficial Innovations, Inc. regarding Additional Disclosures (Adams, Julien)
May 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 177 Joint MOTION for Discovery regarding Cross-Use of Common Discovery by Cnet Networks, Inc.(a Delaware Corporation), Jabez Networks, Inc.(a Tennessee Corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Joint Motion for Cross-Use of Common Discovery)(Itchon, Edric)
May 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 176 NOTICE of Disclosure by Cnet Networks, Inc.(a Delaware Corporation) regarding Additional Disclosures (Itchon, Edric)
May 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 175 NOTICE of Disclosure by CareerBuilder, LLC regarding Additional Disclosures (DeVasto, Diane)
May 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ***REPLACES # 713 ***Consent MOTION for Extension regarding Additional Disclosures by Eric's Universe Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeVasto, Diane) Modified on 5/29/2009 (ch, ).
May 29, 2009 Opinion or Order ***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY Document # 173, Motion for Extension. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ATTORNEY WILL REFILE)(ch, )
May 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY. PLEASE IGNORE.***Consent MOTION for Extension regarding Additional Disclosures by Eric's Universe Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeVasto, Diane) Modified on 5/29/2009 (ch, ).
May 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER granting 171 Motion to Clarify Privilege Log Deadline. On or before June 30, 2009 all parties shall exchange privilege logs (or submit a letter to Court stating that there are no disputes as to claims of privileged documents). Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 5/28/09. (ehs, )
May 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 171 Joint MOTION to Clarify Privilege Log Deadline by Beneficial Innovations, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bunt, Robert)
May 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER that The parties are hereby notified that Judge Ward will preside over the Markman hearing set in this matter. The hearing will occur at the same time and date previously indicated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 5/20/09. (ehs, )
May 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 169 AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER - Discovery due by 9/24/2010., Markman Hearing set for 2/3/2010 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham., Motions due by 11/5/2010., Proposed Pretrial Order due by 11/5/2010., Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/22/2010 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham., Jury Selection set for 12/6/2010 09:00AM before Judge T. John Ward. Mediation deadline 11/5/2010. All other deadlines are set forth herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 5/15/09. (ch, )
May 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER granting 167 Motion to reflect defendant's new name. That the Eric's Universe, Inc shall replace eBaum's World Inc and that eBaum World Inc shall be listed on the Court's docket as a terminated party. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 5/1/09. (ehs, ) Modified on 5/5/2009 (jml, ).
April 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 167 Joint MOTION to Change Case Caption to Reflect Name Change by Beneficial Innovations, Inc., Ebaum's World, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeVasto, Diane)
April 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER granting 164 Motion for extension of time to comply with additional disclosures and exchange privilege logs. Deadline extended to 6/30/09. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 4/29/09. (ehs, )
April 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER granting 163 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Kevin C May terminated as counsel for CareerBuilder LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 4/29/09. (ehs, )
April 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 164 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to Comply with Additional Disclosures and Exchange Privilege Logs by The New York Times Company, Beneficial Innovations, Inc., CareerBuilder, LLC, Cnet Networks, Inc., Digg, Inc., Ebaum's World, Inc., Jabez Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeVasto, Diane)
April 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 163 Consent MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and Terminate Electronic Notices for Kevin May by CareerBuilder, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeVasto, Diane)
April 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 162 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 111 Order,,, Set Deadlines/Hearings,, JOINT MOTION TO MOVE THE TRIAL DATE AND REVISE RELATED CASE SCHEDULES by The New York Times Company, Beneficial Innovations, Inc., CareerBuilder, LLC, Cnet Networks, Inc., Digg, Inc., Ebaum's World, Inc., Jabez Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
April 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 161 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daymon Jeffrey Rambin on behalf of Beneficial Innovations, Inc. (Rambin, Daymon)
April 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER granting 159 Unopposed Motion for Extension Regarding Additional Disclosures. Deadline for Defendant Digg to serve its Additional Disclosures, as outlined in paragraph 2 of the Courts Discovery Order (Dkt. 110), is extended up to and including April 30, 2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 4/1/09. (ch, )
March 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 159 Consent MOTION for Extension Regarding Additional Disclosures by Digg, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bartow, D.)
March 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER granting 157 Motion for extension of time to serve additional disclosures, deadline extended to 4/30/09. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 3/31/09. (ehs, )
March 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 157 Consent MOTION for Extension regarding Additional Disclosures by Ebaum's World, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeVasto, Diane)
March 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER granting 153 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Deadline extended to 4/30/09. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 3/25/09. (ehs, )
March 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER granting 152 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Deadline extended to 4/30/09. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 3/25/09. (ehs, )
March 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER granting 151 Motion for extention of Time for the Timesto Comply with Additional Disclosures. Deadline extended to 4/30/09. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 3/25/09. (ehs, )
March 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 153 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery concerning Additional Disclosures by Jabez Networks, Inc.(a Tennessee Corporation), Beneficial Innovations, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Itchon, Edric)
March 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 152 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery concerning Additional Disclosures by Cnet Networks, Inc.(a Delaware Corporation), Beneficial Innovations, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Itchon, Edric)
March 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 151 Agreed MOTION to Amend/Correct 143 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, 110 Order BENEFICIAL INNOVATIONS, INC. AND THE NEW YORK TIMES COMPANY'S AGREED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO COMPLY WITH ADDITIONAL DISCLOSURES by The New York Times Company, Beneficial Innovations, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
March 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER granting 148 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Deadline extended to 4/30/09. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 3/11/09. (ehs, )
March 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 149 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Ellen M Padilla for CareerBuilder, LLC, Ellen M Padilla for CareerBuilder, LLC. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-1-4559) (ehs, )
March 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 148 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery concerning Additional Disclosures by CareerBuilder, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeVasto, Diane)
March 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 147 NOTICE by CareerBuilder, LLC of Change of Firm and Address for Tigran Vardanian (DeVasto, Diane)
February 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 146 NOTICE by CareerBuilder, LLC of Change of Firm and Address for Attorney David Nelson (DeVasto, Diane)
January 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 145 NOTICE of Disclosure by Beneficial Innovations, Inc. of Rule 4-2 disclosures (Adams, Julien)
January 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 144 NOTICE of Disclosure by The New York Times Company, CareerBuilder, LLC, Cnet Networks, Inc., Digg, Inc., Ebaum's World, Inc., Jabez Networks, Inc. regarding P.R. 4-2 (DeVasto, Diane)
December 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER granting 142 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order and Discovery Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 12/23/08. (ch, )
December 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 142 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 110 Order, 111 Order,,, Set Deadlines/Hearings,, by The New York Times Company. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
December 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER granting 140 Motion to Amend/Correct. Deadlines are set forth herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 12/19/08. (ch, )
December 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 140 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 110 Order, 111 Order,,, Set Deadlines/Hearings,, by The New York Times Company. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
November 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 139 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Edric Cruz Itchon for Cnet Networks, Inc., Jabez Networks, Inc., Cnet Networks, Inc. and Jabez Networks, Inc. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 2-1-4242. (ch, )
November 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 138 NOTICE of Disclosure by Beneficial Innovations, Inc. regarding P.R. 4-1 (Adams, Julien)
November 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 137 NOTICE of Disclosure by The New York Times Company, CareerBuilder, LLC, Cnet Networks, Inc., Digg, Inc., Ebaum's World, Inc., Jabez Networks, Inc. regarding P.R. 4-1 (DeVasto, Diane)
October 27, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER - Case is consolidated with 2:07-cv-555, for purposes of claim construction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 9/23/08. (ch, )
October 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 135 NOTICE of Disclosure by Jabez Networks, Inc.(a Tennessee Corporation) Pursuant to P.R. 3-3(c) and 3-4 (Koehl, Richard)
October 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 134 NOTICE of Disclosure by Cnet Networks, Inc.(a Delaware Corporation) Pursuant to P.R. 3-3(c) and 3-4 (Koehl, Richard)
October 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 133 NOTICE by The New York Times Company THE NEW YORK TIMES COMPANY'S NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH P.R. 3-4(a) (Baxter, Samuel)
October 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 132 NOTICE of Disclosure by Digg, Inc. regarding P.R. 3-4(a) (DeVasto, Diane)
October 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 131 NOTICE of Disclosure by The New York Times Company, CareerBuilder, LLC, Cnet Networks, Inc., Digg, Inc., Ebaum's World, Inc., Jabez Networks, Inc. regarding P.R. 3-3 and 3-4(b) (DeVasto, Diane)
October 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 130 NOTICE of Disclosure by Ebaum's World, Inc. regarding P.R. 3-4(a) (DeVasto, Diane)
October 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 129 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Diane DeVasto on behalf of Digg, Inc. (DeVasto, Diane)
October 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 128 NOTICE of Disclosure by CareerBuilder, LLC regarding P.R. 3-4(a) (DeVasto, Diane)
September 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER granting 126 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Otis W Carroll, Jr and Deborah J Race terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 9/30/08. (ehs, )
September 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 126 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Beneficial Innovations, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Carroll, Otis)
September 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER granting 124 Motion to Amend docket control order. Deadline to comply with PR 3-3 and PR 3-4 reset to 10/20/08. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 9/5/08. (ehs, )
September 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 124 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 116 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, 111 Order,,, Set Deadlines/Hearings,, by The New York Times Company, Beneficial Innovations, Inc., CareerBuilder, LLC, Cnet Networks, Inc., Digg, Inc., Ebaum's World, Inc., Jabez Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
July 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 123 NOTICE of Disclosure by The New York Times Company (Baxter, Samuel)
July 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 122 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Cnet Networks, Inc.(a Delaware Corporation) identifying Corporate Parent CBS Corporation for Cnet Networks, Inc., Cnet Networks, Inc., Cnet Networks, Inc.. (Koehl, Richard)
July 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 121 NOTICE by Beneficial Innovations, Inc. of filing Initial, 3-1 and 3-2 disclosures (Adams, Julien)
July 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 120 NOTICE of Disclosure by Ebaum's World, Inc. regarding Initial Disclosure Statement (DeVasto, Diane)
July 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 119 NOTICE of Disclosure by Jabez Networks, Inc.(a Tennessee Corporation) (Koehl, Richard)
July 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 118 NOTICE of Disclosure by Cnet Networks, Inc.(a Delaware Corporation) (Koehl, Richard)
July 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 117 NOTICE of Disclosure by CareerBuilder, LLC regarding Initial Disclosures (DeVasto, Diane)
July 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER granting 115 Motion to Amend docket control order. Deadline extended to July 18, 2008 Comply with P.R. 3-1 and 3-2 and September 5, 2008 Comply with P.R. 3-3 and 3-4. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/17/08. (ehs, )
July 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 115 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 110 Order, 111 Order,,, Set Deadlines/Hearings,, by The New York Times Company, Beneficial Innovations, Inc., CareerBuilder, LLC, Cnet Networks, Inc., Digg, Inc., Ebaum's World, Inc., Jabez Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeVasto, Diane)
July 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 114 NOTICE of Disclosure by Digg, Inc.(a Delaware Corporation) of Initial Disclosures (Cooper, Byron)
July 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 113 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Richard M Koehl on behalf of Jabez Networks, Inc.(a Tennessee Corporation) (Koehl, Richard)
July 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 112 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Richard M Koehl on behalf of Cnet Networks, Inc.(a Delaware Corporation) (Koehl, Richard)
June 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 111 DOCKET CONTROL ORDER - Amended Pleadings due by 2/10/2009., Discovery due by 4/23/2010., Joinder of Parties due by 12/10/2008., Claims Construction Hearing set for 2/3/2010 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham., Motions due by 5/7/2010., Proposed Pretrial Order due by 5/7/2010., Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/24/2010 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham., Jury Selection set for 6/7/2010 09:00AM before Judge T. John Ward. Mediation deadline 5/7/2010. All other deadlines are set forth herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/4/08. (ch, )
June 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 110 DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/4/08. (ch, )
May 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER granting 107 Motion to extend time to submit discoovery and docket control order. Deadline extended to 5/29/08. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 5/29/08. (ehs, )
May 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 108 Joint MOTION for Entry of Docket Control Order and Discovery Order by The New York Times Company, The Washington Post Company, Beneficial Innovations, Inc., CareerBuilder, LLC, Cnet Networks, Inc., Digg, Inc., Ebaum's World, Inc., Jabez Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 proposed Docket Control Order, # 2 proposed Discovery Order)(DeVasto, Diane)
May 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 107 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Submit Docket Control Order and Discovery Order by The New York Times Company, The Washington Post Company, Beneficial Innovations, Inc., CareerBuilder, LLC, Cnet Networks, Inc., Digg, Inc., Ebaum's World, Inc., Jabez Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeVasto, Diane)
May 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER granting 103 Motion to Dismiss deft Washingtonpost.Newsweek Interactive Co LLC with prejudice. All costs are assessed against the party who incurred the same. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 5/16/08. (ehs, )
May 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER granting 104 Motion for Extension of Time to File proposed docket control order and proposed discovery order. Deadline extended to 5/22/08. Signed by Judge Charles Everingham on 5/16/08. (ehs, )
May 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 104 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File DEFENDANTS' UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF DEADLINE TO FILE PROPOSED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER AND PROPOSED DISCOVERY ORDER by The New York Times Company, The Weather Channel Interactive, Inc., Blockdot, Inc., CareerBuilder, LLC, Cnet Networks, Inc., Digg, Inc., Ebaum's World, Inc., Jabez Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
May 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 103 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Washingtonpost.Newsweek Interactive Company by Beneficial Innovations, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1Text of Proposed Order)(Adams, Julien) Modified on 5/15/2008 (mpv, ).
May 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge T. John Ward and Judge Charles Everingham: Status Conference held on 5/1/08. Counsel for the parties appeared and were asked if they consented to Judge Everingham. Depending on their answer, they were then given Markman and jury selection dates for the appropriate court. The parties are to meet and confer regarding a scheduling order and discovery order, and the parties have 14 days to submit the proposed orders. Court adjourned. (Court Reporter Susan Simmons.)(delat)
May 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge T. John Ward and Judge Charles Everingham: Status Conference held on 5/01/08. Counsel for the parties appeared and were asked if they consented to Judge Everingham. Depending on their answer, they were then given Markman and jury selection dates for the appropriate court. The parties are to meet and confer regarding a scheduling order and discovery order, and the parties have 14 days to submit the proposed orders. Court adjourned. (Court Reporter Susan Simmons.) (shd, )
April 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER - This case is set for a Status Conference on May 1, 2008. In keeping with the Court's recent practice, the Court intends to give the parties an opportunity, following the conference, to reach agreements on the Docket Control Order and Discovery Order without having to return for an additional conference with the Court. Accordingly, the Court orders that disclosures under P. R. 3-1 and P. R. 3-2 are due on Friday, May 16, 2008. Signed by Judge Charles Everingham on 4/11/08. (ehs, )
April 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 101 NOTICE of Change of Address by Byron Willie Cooper (Cooper, Byron)
April 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 100 NOTICE by Beneficial Innovations, Inc. Notice of Change of Firm Name and Electronic Addresses (DeRieux, Elizabeth)
April 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER - The purpose of the conference will be to assign a claim construction hearing date and a trial setting. The parties shall be prepared to inform the Court whether they will consent to trial before the Magistrate Judge. Status Conference set for 5/1/2008 09:15 AM before Judge T. John Ward. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 4/3/08. (ehs, )
November 28, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER granting 97 Motion to Dismiss deft The Weather Channel Interactive, Inc with prejudica. All costs are assessed against the party who incurredthem. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 11/28/07. (ehs, )
November 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 97 Joint MOTION to Dismiss The Weather Channel Interactive, Inc. by Beneficial Innovations, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Dismissal with Prejudice)(Adams, Julien)
November 16, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER granting 95 Motion to Dismiss. Dft Blockdot, Inc is hereby dismissed with prejudice to the right of these parties to assert in the future any such claims. All costs are assessed against the party who incurred them. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 11/16/07. (ch, )
November 13, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 95 Joint MOTION to Dismiss by Beneficial Innovations, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Order of Dismissal with Prejudice)(Adams, Julien)
October 22, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 94 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Brian S Rosenbloom for The New York Times Company.(APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 2-1-3143 (ch, )
October 22, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 93 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Steven M Lieberman for The New York Times Company.(APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 2-1-3143 (ch, )
October 22, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER granting 91 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Andrew Wesley Spangler terminated as counsel of record for Beneficial Innovations, Inc.. Signed by Judge Charles Everingham on 10/22/07. (ch, )
October 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 91 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Plaintiff Beneficial Innovations, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion to Withdraw Andrew W. Spangler as Counsel for Plaintiff by Beneficial Innovations, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Capshaw, Sidney)
October 15, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ANSWER to Counterclaim Plaintiff and Counterdefendant Beneficial Innovations, Inc.'s Reply to Counterclaims of The New York Times Company by Beneficial Innovations, Inc., Beneficial Innovations, Inc..(Abernathy, Nancy)
October 15, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ANSWER to Counterclaim Plaintiff and Counterdefendant Beneficial Innovations, Inc.'s Reply to Counterclaims of Jabez Networks, Inc. by Beneficial Innovations, Inc., Beneficial Innovations, Inc..(Abernathy, Nancy)
October 15, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ANSWER to Counterclaim Plaintiff and Counterdefendant Beneficial Innovations, Inc.'s Reply to Counterclaims of CNET Networks, Inc. by Beneficial Innovations, Inc., Beneficial Innovations, Inc..(Abernathy, Nancy)
October 15, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ANSWER to Counterclaim Plaintiff and Counterdefendant Beneficial Innovations, Inc.'s Reply to Counterclaims of Digg, Inc. by Beneficial Innovations, Inc., Beneficial Innovations, Inc..(Abernathy, Nancy)
October 15, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 86 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nancy Claire Abernathy on behalf of Beneficial Innovations, Inc. (Abernathy, Nancy)
October 11, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 85 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by The New York Times Company identifying None as Corporate Parent. (Baxter, Samuel)
October 9, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 84 AMENDED ANSWER to and Affirmative Defenses of Defendant E'Baum's World, Inc. to Second 64 Amended Complaint, by Ebaum's World, Inc.. (Jones, Michael)
September 28, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 83 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Glenn J Pfadenhauer for Washingtonpost.Newsweek Interactive Company, LLC. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 6-1-11181 (ch, )
September 28, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 82 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Thomas G Hentoff for Washingtonpost.Newsweek Interactive Company, LLC. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 6-1-11181 (ch, )
September 28, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 81 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Holly M Conley for Washingtonpost.Newsweek Interactive Company, LLC. (APPROVED)(FEE PADI) 6-1-11181 (ch, )
September 28, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 80 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Aaron P Maurer for Washingtonpost.Newsweek Interactive Company, LLC. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 6-1-11181 (ch, )
September 28, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ANSWER to Amended Complaint (Second Amended Complaint) by The Weather Channel Interactive, Inc..(Jones, Michael)
September 28, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ANSWER to Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Beneficial Innovations, Inc. by The New York Times Company.(Baxter, Samuel)
September 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 77 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Ebaum's World, Inc. identifying no corporate parent as Corporate Parent. (Jones, Michael)
September 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ANSWER to Amended Complaint [Second] by Ebaum's World, Inc..(Jones, Michael)
September 25, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 75 Digg Inc.'s ANSWER to Amended Complaint (Second) and, COUNTERCLAIM against Beneficial Innovations, Inc., Beneficial Innovations, Inc. by Digg, Inc., Digg, Inc..(Cooper, Byron)
September 25, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ANSWER to Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Beneficial Innovations, Inc. by Jabez Networks, Inc..(Geiszler, Steven)
September 25, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ANSWER to Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Beneficial Innovations, Inc. by Cnet Networks, Inc..(Geiszler, Steven)
September 25, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 72 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by CareerBuilder, LLC identifying no corporate parent as Corporate Parent. (DeVasto, Diane)
September 25, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 71 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Washingtonpost.Newsweek Interactive Company, LLC identifying The Washington Post Company as Corporate Parent. (Jones, Michael)
September 25, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Washingtonpost.Newsweek Interactive Company, LLC.(Jones, Michael)
September 25, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ANSWER to Amended Complaint , Affirmative Defenses, and Demand for Jury Trial by CareerBuilder, LLC.(DeVasto, Diane)
September 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 68 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Beneficial Innovations, Inc.. Washingtonpost.Newsweek Interactive Company, LLC served by Process Server on 9/17/2007, answer due 10/9/2007. (ch, )
September 18, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 67 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Jason M Roth for Ebaum's World, Inc. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 6-1-11078. (ch, )
September 18, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 66 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Frank G Montemalo for Ebaum's World, Inc. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 6-1-11078. (ch, )
September 14, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 65 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Tigran Vardanian for CareerBuilder, LLC. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 2-1-2998 (ch, )
September 11, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 64 AMENDED COMPLAINT Second Amended Complaint against Washingtonpost.Newsweek Interactive Company, LLC, The New York Times Company, The Weather Channel Interactive, Inc., Blockdot, Inc., CareerBuilder, LLC, Cnet Networks, Inc., Digg, Inc., Ebaum's World, Inc., Jabez Networks, Inc., filed by Beneficial Innovations, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
September 11, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER granting 62 Motion to file a Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Charles Everingham on 9/11/07. (ch, )
September 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 62 MOTION to Amend/Correct 7 Amended Complaint Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint by Beneficial Innovations, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint# 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Second Amended Complaint# 3 Exhibit Exhibit A to Exhibit 1# 4 Exhibit Exhibit B to Exhibit 1)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
September 5, 2007 Opinion or Order Answer Due Deadline Updated for The Washington Post Company to 9/12/2007. (ch, )
September 5, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER granting 53 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The Washington Post Co. deadline is extended to 9/12/07 . Signed by Judge Charles Everingham on 9/5/07. (ch, )
September 4, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ***REPLACES #57***CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Cnet Networks, Inc. identifying T. Rowe Price Group, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Geiszler, Steven) Modified on 9/5/2007 (mpv, ).
September 4, 2007 Opinion or Order ***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 57, Notice of Corporate Disclosure, incorrectly titled ANSWER. ATTORNEY WILL REFILE PLEASE IGNORE.*** (rml, )
September 4, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 59 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Jabez Networks, Inc. identifying None as Corporate Parent. (Geiszler, Steven) Modified by clerk to add corporate parent on 9/5/2007 (mpv, ).
September 4, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ANSWER to Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Beneficial Innovations, Inc. by Jabez Networks, Inc..(Geiszler, Steven)
September 4, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ***FILED IN ERROR; REPLACED BY # 60 ; PLEASE IGNORE***CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Cnet Networks, Inc. identifying T. Rowe Price Group, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Geiszler, Steven) Modified on 9/5/2007 (mpv, ).
September 4, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ANSWER to Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Beneficial Innovations, Inc. by Cnet Networks, Inc..(Geiszler, Steven)
September 4, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 55 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Digg, Inc., Digg, Inc. identifying None as Corporate Parent. (Cooper, Byron) Modified to add corporate parent on 9/5/2007 (mpv, ).
August 31, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 54 Digg Inc.'s ANSWER to Amended Complaint and, COUNTERCLAIM against Beneficial Innovations, Inc. by Digg, Inc..(Cooper, Byron)
August 31, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 53 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 7 Amended Complaint by The Washington Post Company. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
August 22, 2007 Opinion or Order Answer Due Deadline Updated for Careerbuilder, LLC to 9/12/2007. (ehs, )
August 22, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting 51 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Deadline for CareerBuilder reset to 9/12/07 . Signed by Judge Charles Everingham on 8/22/07. (ehs, )
August 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 51 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 7 Amended Complaint , Move, or Otherwise by Careerbuilder, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeVasto, Diane)
August 14, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 50 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Deborah J Race on behalf of Beneficial Innovations, Inc. (Race, Deborah)
August 13, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 49 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Richard B LeBlanc for The Weather Channel Interactive, Inc. (APPROVED) (FEE PAID) 2-1-2890. (ch, )
August 13, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 48 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Steven J Rocci for The Weather Channel Interactive, Inc.(APPROVED) (FEE PAID) 2-1-2890. (ch, )
August 13, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ANSWER to Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Ebaum's World, Inc..(Jones, Michael)
August 8, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting 43 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The Weather Channel Interactive Inc. deadline is extended to 9/12/07 . Signed by Judge Charles Everingham on 8/8/07. (ch, )
August 7, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 45 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney David A Nelson for Careerbuilder, LLC.(APPROVED) (FEE PAID) 2-1-2867 (ch, )
August 7, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 44 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Kevin C May for Careerbuilder, LLC.(APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 2-1-2867 (ch, )
August 6, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 7 Amended Complaint [Unopposed] by The Weather Channel Interactive, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
August 6, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 42 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Byron Willie Cooper on behalf of Digg, Inc. (Cooper, Byron)
August 2, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 41 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mark Nolan Reiter on behalf of CNET Networks, Inc. (Reiter, Mark)
August 2, 2007 Opinion or Order Answer Due Deadline Updated for The New York Times Company to 9/12/2007. (ch, )
August 2, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting 38 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The New York Times deadline is extended to 9/12/07 . Signed by Judge Charles Everingham on 8/2/07. (ch, )
August 1, 2007 Opinion or Order Answer Due Deadline Updated for Digg, Inc. to 8/31/2007. (ch, )
August 1, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting 30 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Deadline for Digg Inc. is 8/31/07 . Signed by Judge Charles Everingham on 8/1/07. (ch, )
August 1, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 7 Amended Complaint by The New York Times Company. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
July 31, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 37 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Beneficial Innovations, Inc.. Digg, Inc. served by Process Server on 7/12/2007, answer due 8/1/2007. (ch, )
July 31, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 36 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Beneficial Innovations, Inc.. CNET Networks, Inc. served by Process Server on 7/10/2007, answer due 7/30/2007. (ch, )
July 31, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 35 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Beneficial Innovations, Inc.. The Washington Post Company served by Process Server on 7/6/2007, answer due 7/26/2007. (ch, )
July 31, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 34 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Beneficial Innovations, Inc.. Jabez Networks, Inc. served by Process Server on 7/11/2007, answer due 7/31/2007. (ch, )
July 31, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 33 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Beneficial Innovations, Inc.. Careerbuilder, LLC served by Process Server on 7/6/2007, answer due 7/26/2007. (ch, )
July 31, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 32 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Beneficial Innovations, Inc.. The Weather Channel Interactive, Inc. served by Process Server on 7/16/2007, answer due 8/6/2007. (ch, )
July 31, 2007 Opinion or Order Answer Due Deadline Updated for CNET Networks, Inc. to 9/4/2007. (ch, )
July 31, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting 21 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. CNET Networks, Inc., deadline is extended to 9/4/07 . Signed by Judge Charles Everingham on 7/31/07. (ch, )
July 31, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Digg, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bartow, D.)
July 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Answer Due Deadline Updated for Jabez Networks, Inc. to 9/4/2007. (ch, )
July 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting 22 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Jabea Networks, Inc. deadline is extended to 9/4/07 . Signed by Judge Charles Everingham on 7/27/07. (ch, )
July 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Answer Due Deadline Updated for Careerbuilder, LLC to 8/27/2007. (ch, )
July 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting 24 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Career Builder LLC deadline is extended to 8/27/07 . Signed by Judge Charles Everingham on 7/27/07. (ch, )
July 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 27 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Wayne M Barsky for CNET Networks, Inc.(APPROVED) (FEE PAID) 2-1-2831. (ch, )
July 25, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ANSWER to Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Blockdot, Inc..(Heartfield, J)
July 25, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 25 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gregory Scott Dovel on behalf of Beneficial Innovations, Inc. (Dovel, Gregory)
July 25, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 7 Amended Complaint , Move, or Otherwise Respond by Careerbuilder, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeVasto, Diane)
July 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 23 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Julien Antonio Adams on behalf of Beneficial Innovations, Inc. (Adams, Julien)
July 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Jabez Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Geiszler, Steven)
July 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by CNET Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Geiszler, Steven)
July 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Answer Due Deadline Updated for The Washington Post Company to 9/4/2007. (ch, )
July 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting 19 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The Washington Post deadline is extended to 9/4/07 . Signed by Judge Charles Everingham on 7/19/07. (ch, )
July 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 7 Amended Complaint [Unopposed] by The Washington Post Company. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
July 17, 2007 Opinion or Order ***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 17, Summons Returned, wrong date entered of service by process server. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
July 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ***REPLACES DOCUMENT 17 WHICH WAS FILED IN ERROR***E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Beneficial Innovations, Inc.. The New York Times Company served by Process Server on 7/12/2007, answer due 8/1/2007. (ch, ) Modified on 7/17/2007 (ch, ).
July 16, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ***FILED IN ERROR. SEE CORRECTED DOCUMENT 18 ***E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Beneficial Innovations, Inc.. The New York Times Company served by Process Server on 2/12/2007, answer due 3/5/2007. (ch, ) Modified on 7/17/2007 (ch, ).
July 16, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrew Wesley Spangler on behalf of Beneficial Innovations, Inc. (Spangler, Andrew)
July 16, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sidney Calvin Capshaw, III on behalf of Beneficial Innovations, Inc. (Capshaw, Sidney)
July 11, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 14 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Beneficial Innovations, Inc.. Ebaum's World, Inc. served by Process Server on 7/6/2007, answer due 7/26/2007. (ch, )
July 11, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 13 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to The New York Times Company. (ch, )
July 9, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 12 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Beneficial Innovations, Inc.. Blockdot, Inc. served on 7/5/2007, answer due 7/25/2007. (ehs, )
July 2, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 11 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to The New York Times Company, The Washington Post Company, The Weather Channel Interactive, Inc., Blockdot, Inc., Careerbuilder, LLC, CNET Networks, Inc., Digg, Inc., Ebaum's World, Inc., Jabez Networks, Inc.. (ch, )
June 28, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Franklin Jones, Jr on behalf of Beneficial Innovations, Inc. (Jones, Franklin)
June 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Charles Ainsworth on behalf of Beneficial Innovations, Inc. (Ainsworth, Charles)
June 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert Christopher Bunt on behalf of Beneficial Innovations, Inc. (Bunt, Robert)
June 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT (First Amended Complaint) against all defendants, filed by Beneficial Innovations, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
June 22, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing fee: $ 350.00, receipt number 2-1-2704 (ch, )
June 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Otis W Carroll, Jr on behalf of Beneficial Innovations, Inc. (Carroll, Otis)
June 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Magistrate Consent Form Mailed to Beneficial Innovations, Inc. (ch, )
June 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 6/20/07. (ch, )
June 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Form mailed to Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks. (ch, )
June 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Beneficial Innovations, Inc. identifying None as Corporate Parent. (ch, )
June 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 1 ORIGINAL COMPLAINT FOR INFRINGEMENT WITH TRIAL DEMANDED against The New York Times Company, The Washington Post Company, The Weather Channel Interactive, Inc., Blockdot, Inc., Careerbuilder, LLC, CNET Networks, Inc., Digg, Inc., Ebaum's World, Inc., Jabez Networks, Inc. (Filing fee $ 350.) , filed by Beneficial Innovations, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ch, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beneficial Innovations, Inc. v. Blockdot, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beneficial Innovations, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew Wesley Spangler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blockdot, Inc.
Represented By: J Thad Heartfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CareerBuilder, LLC
Represented By: Tigran Vardanian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cnet Networks, Inc.
Represented By: Mark Nolan Reiter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Digg, Inc.
Represented By: Byron Willie Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ebaum's World, Inc.
Represented By: Jason M Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jabez Networks, Inc.
Represented By: Steven Mark Geiszler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The New York Times Company
Represented By: Samuel Franklin Baxter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Washington Post Company
Represented By: Michael Edwin Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Weather Channel Interactive, Inc.
Represented By: Steven J Rocci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washingtonpost.Newsweek Interactive Company, LLC
Represented By: Glenn J Pfadenhauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Digg, Inc.
Represented By: Byron Willie Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Cnet Networks, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Jabez Networks, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: The New York Times Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Beneficial Innovations, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?