Function Media, L.L.C. v. Google, Inc. et al Featured Case

Plaintiff alleges that Google's AdSense and AdWords technologies, Google Print Ads, and Yahoo's Publisher and Content Match technologies infringe on its patents.

Plaintiff: Function Media, L.L.C.
Defendant: Google, Inc. and Yahoo!, Inc.
Counter Claimant: Google, Inc. and Yahoo!, Inc.
Counter Defendant: Function Media, L.L.C.
Case Number: 2:2007cv00279
Filed: July 3, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Marshall Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: T. John Ward
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2011 Filing 490 Redaction of 437 Transcript. (ehs, )
January 18, 2011 Filing 489 Redaction of 436 Transcript. (ehs, )
January 18, 2011 Filing 488 Redaction of 433 Transcript. (ehs, )
January 18, 2011 Filing 487 Redaction of 432 Transcript. (ehs, )
January 18, 2011 Filing 486 Redaction of 431 Transcript. (ehs, )
January 18, 2011 Filing 485 Redaction of 430 Transcript. (ehs, )
October 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 484 ORDER granting in part 477 Motion to Redact. ORDERED that the court reporter redact the following passages from all publicly available versions of the trial transcripts. re 433 Transcript,,, 431 Transcript,,, 432 Transcript,,, 430 Transcript,,, 436 Transcript,,, 429 Transcript,,, The request to seal the preceding portions of the trial transcripts is DENIED as moot, as the court reporter has been instructed to redacte those passages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 10/25/2010. (ch, )
October 21, 2010 Filing 483 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of MOTIONS HEARING held on 8/19/10 before Judge Chad Everingham. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Hlmes, CSR,Telephone number: (903) 663-5082. (181 Pages)NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/15/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/26/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/24/2011. (tja, )
September 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 482 ORDER granting 363 Motion to Expedite; finding as moot 365 Motion to Expedite; granting 190 Motion ; granting 265 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply ; finding as moot 332 Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 9/3/10. (ehs, )
August 19, 2010 Filing 481 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham: Motion Hearing held on 8/19/2010 re Post trial motions(Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign-in Sheet) (jml)
July 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 480 NOTICE of Hearing: Hearing on all pending post-trial motions RESET for 8/19/2010, 09:00 AM, in Mag Ctrm (Marshall) before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham.(delat)
July 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 479 NOTICE of Hearing: Hearing on all pending post-trial motions set for 7/21/2010, 01:00 PM, in Mag Ctrm (Marshall) before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham.(delat, )
May 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 478 SEALED SURREPLY in Opposition to Motion re 457 SEALED MOTION for New Trial filed by Google, Inc.. (DeFranco, Edward)
April 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 477 Unopposed MOTION to Redact 433 Transcript,,, 431 Transcript,,, 432 Transcript,,, 430 Transcript,,, 436 Transcript,,, 429 Transcript,,, (Googles Unopposed Amended Motion to Seal and Redact Portions of Trial Transcripts) by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Candido, Amy)
April 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 476 ORDER granting 475 Motion for Extension of Time to File Sur-Reply to Function media's Motion for a New Trial on 5/5/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 4/28/2010. (ch, )
April 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 475 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Sur-Reply Briefing as to 457 SEALED MOTION for New Trial by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeFranco, Edward)
April 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 474 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 457 SEALED MOTION for New Trial filed by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Tribble, Max)
April 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 473 ORDER granting 472 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Google Inc shall be permitted to file five additional pages, for a total of ten pages, in its Surreply. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 4/21/2010. (ch, )
April 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 471 ORDER granting 470 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jessica Lea Hannah terminated as counsel for Function Media. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 4/13/10. (ehs, )
April 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 470 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Jessica L. Hannah by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
April 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 469 ORDER - The court, sua sponte, VACATES its earlier order and DENIES Googles motion. Googles confidentiality concerns are adequately addressed by sealing the portions of the transcript that contain sensitive information. Accordingly, Google may file a motion to seal that identifies unsealed portions of the transcript that contain confidential information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 4/12/10. (ehs, )
April 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 468 ORDER granting 466 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 4/9/10. (ehs, )
April 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 467 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 457 SEALED MOTION for New Trial filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A1, # 2 Exhibit A2, # 3 Exhibit A3, # 4 Exhibit A4, # 5 Exhibit A5, # 6 Exhibit A6, # 7 Exhibit A7, # 8 Exhibit B, # 9 Exhibit C, # 10 Text of Proposed Order)(DeFranco, Edward)
April 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 466 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Its Opposition to Function Media's Motion for a New Trial by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeFranco, Edward)
March 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 465 ORDER granting 464 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 457 SEALED MOTION for New Trial Google shall file its Opposition to Function Medias Motion For a New Trial on or before 4/8/2010Function Media shall file its Reply in Support of Its Motion For a New Trial on or before 4/22/2010 Google shall file its Sur-Reply in Opposition to Function Medias Motion For a New Trial on or before 4/30/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 3/29/2010. (ch, )
March 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 464 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 457 SEALED MOTION for New Trial --- Agreed Upon Modified Briefing Schedule by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeFranco, Edward)
March 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 463 SEALED SURREPLY to Motion re 409 SEALED MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Validity filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(DeFranco, Edward)
March 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 462 ORDER granting 461 Motion for Extension of Time to File Sur-Reply to Function Medias Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Validity. Responses due by 3/18/2010. Deadline for its Opposition to Function Media's Motion for a New Trial extended to April 1, 2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 3/9/10. (ehs, )
March 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 461 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (1) GOOGLES SUR-REPLY TO FUNCTION MEDIAS MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW ON VALIDITY AND FOR (2) GOOGLE'S OPPOSITION TO FUNCTION MEDIA'S MOTION FOR A NEW TRIAL by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeFranco, Edward)
March 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 460 ORDER granting 456 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages Limit on its Motion for New Trial. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 3/4/10. (ehs, )
March 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 459 ORDER granting 454 Motion for Leave to File Excess Page Limit on its Reply in Support of its Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Validity. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 3/4/10. (ehs, )
March 4, 2010 Opinion or Order ***FILED IN ERROR. ORDERS ARE NOT FILED AS A SEPARATE DOCUMENT Document # 458,. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (CLERK HAS ATTACHED ORDER TO DOCUMENT # 457)(ch, )
March 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 458 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE.***Additional Attachments to Main Document: 457 SEALED MOTION for New Trial.. (Tribble, Max) Modified on 3/4/2010 (ch, ).
March 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 457 SEALED MOTION for New Trial by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2A, # 3 Exhibit 2B, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17, # 19 Exhibit 18, # 20 Exhibit 19, # 21 Exhibit 20, # 22 Exhibit 21, # 23 Exhibit 22, # 24 Exhibit 23, # 25 Exhibit 24, # 26 Exhibit 25, # 27 Exhibit 26, # 28 Exhibit 27)(Tribble, Max) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/4/2010: # 29 Text of Proposed Order) (ch, ).
March 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 456 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in its Motion for New Trial by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tribble, Max)
March 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 455 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 409 SEALED MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Validity filed by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Appendix)(Tribble, Max)
March 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 454 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in its Reply in Support of its Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Validity by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Grinstein, Joseph)
March 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 453 ***VACATED PER ORDER # 469 ***ORDER granting 452 Motion to Redact re 428 Transcript, 433 Transcript, 431 Transcript, 432 Transcript, 430 Transcript, 436 Transcript, 437 Transcript, 429 Transcript, 434 Transcript, 427 Transcript, 435 Transcript.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 3/1/10. (ehs, ) Modified on 4/12/2010 (ehs, ).
February 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 452 Unopposed MOTION to Redact 433 Transcript,,, 431 Transcript,,, 432 Transcript,,, 430 Transcript,,, 436 Transcript,,, 437 Transcript,,, 429 Transcript,,, by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Candido, Amy)
February 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 451 ORDER denying 120 Motion for Protective Order; denying 150 Motion to Expedite. The motion for protective order was orally DENIED. The motion to expedite is DENIED as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 2/26/2010. (ch, )
February 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 450 NOTICE of Intent to Request Redaction by Amy H Candido re 428 Transcript,,, 433 Transcript,,, 431 Transcript,,, 432 Transcript,,, 430 Transcript,,, 436 Transcript,,, 437 Transcript,,, 429 Transcript,,, 434 Transcript,,, 427 Transcript,,, 435 Transcript,,,. (Candido, Amy)
February 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 449 ORDER granting 446 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Function Media's Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Validity. Responses due by 3/3/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 2/22/10. (ehs, )
February 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 448 REPLY to Response to Motion re 406 SEALED MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Regarding Damages filed by Google, Inc.. (DeFranco, Edward)
February 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 447 REPLY to Response to Motion re 412 SEALED MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Regarding Invalidity filed by Google, Inc.. (DeFranco, Edward)
February 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 446 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 445 Sealed Response to Motion, by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Grinstein, Joseph)
February 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 445 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 409 SEALED MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Validity filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2 part 1, # 4 Exhibit 2 part 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6, # 9 Exhibit 7, # 10 Exhibit 8, # 11 Exhibit 9, # 12 Errata 10, # 13 Exhibit 11, # 14 Exhibit 12, # 15 Exhibit 13, # 16 Exhibit 14, # 17 Exhibit 15)(DeFranco, Edward)
February 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 444 ORDER granting 443 Motion for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Function Medias Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Validity. Responses due by 2/16/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 2/12/10. (ehs, )
February 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 443 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 409 SEALED MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Validity by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Candido, Amy)
February 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 442 NOTICE of Intent to Request Redaction by Amy H Candido re 428 Transcript,,, 433 Transcript,,, 431 Transcript,,, 432 Transcript,,, 430 Transcript,,, 436 Transcript,,, 437 Transcript,,, 429 Transcript,,, 434 Transcript,,, 427 Transcript,,, 435 Transcript,,,. (Candido, Amy)
February 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 441 RESPONSE to Motion re 412 SEALED MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Regarding Invalidity filed by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tribble, Max)
February 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 440 RESPONSE to Motion re 406 SEALED MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Regarding Damages filed by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tribble, Max)
February 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 439 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 408 Amended SEALED MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Non-Infringement filed by Google, Inc.. (DeFranco, Edward)
February 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 438 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 1/26/10 Afternoon - Verdict before Judge Chad Everingham. Court Reporter/Transcriber: S. Simmons/S. Holmes,Telephone number: 903/935-3868. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 2/26/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/8/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/6/2010. (lss, )
February 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 437 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 1/26/10 Morning Session of Trial before Judge Chad Everingham. Court Reporter/Transcriber: S. Simmons/S. Holmes,Telephone number: 903/935-3868. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 2/26/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/8/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/6/2010. (lss, )
February 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 436 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 1/25/10 Afternoon Session of Trial before Judge Chad Everingham. Court Reporter/Transcriber: S. Simmons/S. Holmes,Telephone number: 903/935-3868. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 2/26/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/8/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/6/2010. (lss, )
February 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 435 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 1/25/10 Morning Session of Trial before Judge Chad Everingham. Court Reporter/Transcriber: S. Simmons/S. Holmes,Telephone number: 903/935-3868. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 2/26/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/8/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/6/2010. (lss, )
February 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 434 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 1/22/10 Afternoon Session of Trial before Judge Chad Everingham. Court Reporter/Transcriber: S. Simmons/S. Holmes,Telephone number: 903/935-3868. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 2/26/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/8/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/6/2010. (lss, )
February 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 433 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 1/22/10 Morning Session of Trial before Judge Chad Everingham. Court Reporter/Transcriber: S. Simmons/S. Holmes,Telephone number: 903/935-3868. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 2/26/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/8/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/6/2010. (lss, )
February 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 432 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 1/21/10 Afternoon Session before Judge Chad Everingham. Court Reporter/Transcriber: S. Simmons/S. Holmes,Telephone number: 903/935-3868. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 2/26/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/8/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/6/2010. (lss, )
February 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 431 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 1/21/10 Morning Session before Judge Chad Everingham. Court Reporter/Transcriber: S. Simmons/S. Holmes,Telephone number: 903/935-3868. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 2/26/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/8/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/6/2010. (lss, )
February 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 430 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 1/20/10 Afternoon Session before Judge Chad Everingham. Court Reporter/Transcriber: S. Simmons/S. Holmes,Telephone number: 903/935-3868. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 2/26/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/8/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/6/2010. (lss, )
February 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 429 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 1/20/10 Morning Session of Trial before Judge Chad Everingham. Court Reporter/Transcriber: S. Simmons/S. Holmes,Telephone number: 903/935-3868. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 2/26/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/8/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/6/2010. (lss, )
February 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 428 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 1/19/10 Afternoon Session of Trial before Judge Chad Everingham. Court Reporter/Transcriber: S. Simmons/S. Holmes,Telephone number: 903/935-3868. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 2/26/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/8/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/6/2010. (lss, )
February 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 427 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 1/19/10 Morning Session of Trial before Judge Chad Everingham. Court Reporter/Transcriber: S. Simmons/S. Holmes,Telephone number: 903/935-3868. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 2/26/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/8/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/6/2010. (lss, )
February 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 426 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 1/4/10; Voir Dire Proceedings before Judge Chad Everingham. Court Reporter/Transcriber: S. Simmons/S. Holmes,Telephone number: 903/935-3868. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 2/26/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/8/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/6/2010. (lss, )
February 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 425 Sealed Transcript. All Sealed portions of trial transcript - Sealed Portions No. 1 through No. 16. (Susan Simmons, CSR)
January 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 415 Google's Final Exhibit List. (jml)
January 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 414 Function Media Final Trial Exhibit List. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit List Part 2, # 2 Exhibit List Part 3)(jml, )
January 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 424 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham: Jury Trial completed on 1/26/2010. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR.) (jml)
January 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 418 SEALED Jury Notes. (jml)
January 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 417 Google's proposed Jury Instruction refused by Judge Everingham on 1/26/10.(jml)
January 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 416 Function Media's Proposed Jury Instruction - Refused by Judge Everingham on 1/26/10.(jml)
January 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 413 JURY VERDICT. (jml)
January 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 412 SEALED MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Regarding Invalidity by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K-1, # 12 Exhibit K-2, # 13 Exhibit K-3, # 14 Exhibit K-4, # 15 Exhibit K-5, # 16 Exhibit K-6, # 17 Exhibit K-7, # 18 Exhibit K-8, # 19 Exhibit L, # 20 Exhibit M-1, # 21 Exhibit M-2, # 22 Exhibit M-3, # 23 Exhibit M-4, # 24 Exhibit M-5, # 25 Exhibit M-6, # 26 Exhibit M-7, # 27 Exhibit M-8, # 28 Exhibit M-9, # 29 Exhibit M-10, # 30 Exhibit M-11, # 31 Exhibit M-12, # 32 Exhibit M-13, # 33 Exhibit M-14, # 34 Exhibit N, # 35 Exhibit O, # 36 Exhibit P, # 37 Exhibit Q, # 38 Exhibit R, # 39 Exhibit S, # 40 Text of Proposed Order)(Candido, Amy)
January 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 411 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 410 Sealed Response to Motion,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 2-2, # 2 Exhibit 2-3)(Tribble, Max)
January 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 410 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 408 Amended SEALED MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Non-Infringement filed by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 3, # 3 Exhibit 4, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Tribble, Max)
January 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 409 SEALED MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Validity by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1pt2, # 2 Exhibit 1pt1, # 3 Exhibit 1pt3, # 4 Exhibit 1pt4, # 5 Exhibit 2, # 6 Exhibit 3, # 7 Exhibit 4, # 8 Exhibit 5, # 9 Text of Proposed Order)(Tribble, Max)
January 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 423 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham: Jury Trial held on 1/25/2010. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR.) (jml)
January 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 408 Amended SEALED MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Non-Infringement by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-1, # 2 Exhibit A-2, # 3 Exhibit B-1, # 4 Exhibit B-2, # 5 Exhibit B-3, # 6 Exhibit C, # 7 Exhibit D, # 8 Exhibit E)(Candido, Amy) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/27/2010: # 9 Text of Proposed Order) (ch, ).
January 25, 2010 Opinion or Order ***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 400, 401, 402, Motions and Sealed Attachments. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (SEE CORRECTED DOCUMENT # 403)(ch, )
January 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 407 SEALED MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Non-Infringement by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (part 1), # 2 Exhibit A (part 2), # 3 Exhibit B (part 1), # 4 Exhibit B (part 2), # 5 Exhibit B (part 3), # 6 Exhibit C, # 7 Exhibit D, # 8 Exhibit E)(Candido, Amy) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/25/2010: # 9 Text of Proposed Order) (ch, ).
January 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 406 SEALED MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Regarding Damages by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Candido, Amy) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/25/2010: # 8 Text of Proposed Order) (ch, ).
January 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 405 Emergency SEALED MOTION to Preclude Evidence and Argument Concerning Google's Patent Activities by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, part 1, # 8 Exhibit 7, part 2, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(DeFranco, Edward)
January 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 404 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 403 SEALED MOTION to Enforce Opinion Regarding Google's Expert Michael Wagner filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Candido, Amy)
January 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 403 ***REPLACES # 400, 401, AND 402 *** SEALED MOTION to Enforce Opinion Regarding Google's Expert Michael Wagner by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Tribble, Max) Modified on 1/25/2010 (ch, ).
January 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 402 ***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY. PLEASE IGNORE.*** SEALED MOTION to Enforce Opinion Regarding Google's Expert Michael Wagner by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Tribble, Max) Modified on 1/25/2010 (ch, ).
January 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 401 ***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY. PLEASE IGNORE.***SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 400 MOTION Motion to Enforce Opinion Regarding Google's Expert Michael Wagner. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 2)(Tribble, Max) Modified on 1/25/2010 (ch, ).
January 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 400 ***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY. PLEASE IGNORE.*** MOTION Motion to Enforce Opinion Regarding Google's Expert Michael Wagner by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tribble, Max) Modified on 1/25/2010 (ch, ).
January 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 422 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham: Jury Trial held on 1/22/2010. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR.) (jml)
January 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 421 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham: Jury Trial held on 1/21/2010. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR.) (jml)
January 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 420 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham: Jury Trial held on 1/20/2010. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR.) (jml)
January 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 419 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham: Jury Trial held on 1/19/2010. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR.) (jml)
January 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 399 ORDER granting 389 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages in it Response to Emergency Motion of Google for Sanctions Based on Function Media's Failure to Disclose Michael Dean's Fraudulent Activities. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 1/19/2010. (ch, )
January 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 398 ORDER denying 391 Sealed Emergency Motion to Enforce Order and Prohibit Damages expert testimony. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 1/19/2010. (ch, )
January 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 397 ORDER denying 387 Sealed Emergency Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 1/19/2010. (ch, )
January 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 396 ORDER taking under advisement 364 Sealed Emergency Motion for Adverse Inference Instruction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 1/19/2010. (ch, )
January 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 395 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 387 Emergency SEALED MOTION of Google for Sanctions Based on Function Media's Failure to Disclose Michael Dean's Fraudulent Activities filed by Google, Inc.. (Anderson, Carl)
January 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 394 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 391 Emergency SEALED MOTION to Enforce Court Order filed by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Text of Proposed Order)(Tribble, Max)
January 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 393 Sealed Document - Google's Surreply to Function Media's Emergency Motion for Adverse Inference Instruction Regarding Google's Destruction of Evidence. (Attachments: # 1 Supplemental Beaumont Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 1)(Candido, Amy)
January 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 392 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 391 Emergency SEALED MOTION to Enforce Court Order. (DeFranco, Edward)
January 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 391 Emergency SEALED MOTION to Enforce Court Order by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A part 1, # 3 Exhibit A part 2, # 4 Exhibit A (part 3), # 5 Exhibit A (part 4), # 6 Exhibit A (part 5(, # 7 Exhibit A (part6), # 8 Exhibit A (part 7), # 9 Exhibit A (part 8))(DeFranco, Edward)
January 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 390 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 387 Emergency SEALED MOTION of Google for Sanctions Based on Function Media's Failure to Disclose Michael Dean's Fraudulent Activities filed by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Text of Proposed Order)(Tribble, Max)
January 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 389 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages re Emergency Motion of Google Dkt. 387 by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tribble, Max)
January 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 388 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 364 Emergency SEALED MOTION for Adverse Inference Instruction Regarding Google's Destruction of Evidence filed by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6)(Tribble, Max)
January 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 387 Emergency SEALED MOTION of Google for Sanctions Based on Function Media's Failure to Disclose Michael Dean's Fraudulent Activities by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Todd Kennedy, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, part 1, # 7 Exhibit 5, part 2, # 8 Exhibit 5, part 3, # 9 Exhibit 5, part 4, # 10 Exhibit 5, part 5, # 11 Exhibit 5, part 6, # 12 Exhibit 6, part 1, # 13 Exhibit 6, part 2, # 14 Exhibit 6, part 3, # 15 Exhibit 6, part 4, # 16 Exhibit 6, part 5, # 17 Exhibit 6, part 6, # 18 Exhibit 7, # 19 Exhibit 8, # 20 Exhibit 9, # 21 Exhibit 10, # 22 Text of Proposed Order)(DeFranco, Edward)
January 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 386 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 364 Emergency SEALED MOTION for Adverse Inference Instruction Regarding Google's Alleged Destruction of Evidence filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Theresa H. Beaumont, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Candido, Amy)
January 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 385 ORDER - The court has reviewed the deposition designations and objections thereto. The court sustains Googles objections that are directed toward testimony concerning its own patent prosecution activities. The court overrules the balance of Googles objections to the plaintiffs deposition designations. The plaintiffs objections to Googles deposition designations are carried with the case. The court will address the admissibility of the acquisition documents on a case-by-case basis during the course of the trial. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 1/15/10. (ehs, )
January 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 384 ORDER denying Function Media, L.L.C.s (FM) motion in limine No. 17 (References or Expert Opinions Regarding Prior Art not Previously Selected or Prior Art not Timely Identified/Charted) (Dkt. No. 188). Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 1/15/10. (ehs, )
January 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 383 MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER granting in part and denying inpart Function Media, L.L.C.s (FM) motion to exclude certain expert opinions (Dkt. No. 331). Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 1/15/10. (ehs, )
January 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 382 MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER - granting in part and denying in part Google Inc.s (Google) motion to exclude certain expert opinions (Dkt. No. 329).. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 1/15/10. (ehs, )
January 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 381 MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER - Granting FMs motion for summary judgment of no inequitable conduct and the request for a declaration that this case is exceptional is CARRIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 1/15/10. (ehs, )
January 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 380 ORDER setting forth ruling on motions in limine. The court DENIES these two motions in limine #46 and 48. Motion in limine No. 47 granted. Defendant Google, Inc.s motion in limine No. 1 is granted.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 1/15/10. (ehs, )
January 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 379 Sealed Document - Supplemental Notice to Emergency Motion (Dkt. 364) for Adverse Inference Instrction Regarding Google's Destruction of Evidence. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Tribble, Max) Modified on 1/15/2010 (ch, ).
January 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 378 NOTICE by Function Media, L.L.C., Google, Inc. of Joint Submission of Objections to the Admission of Designated Deposition Tesimony (Anderson, Carl)
January 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 377 NOTICE by Function Media, L.L.C. Function Media's Identification of Documents Falling Outside Google's Objection to Acquisitions Related Documents (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Tribble, Max)
January 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 376 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of MOTIONS HEARING held on 1/12/10 before Judge Chad Everingham. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR,Telephone number: (903) 663-5082. (68 pages)NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/8/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/17/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/19/2010. (tja, )
January 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 375 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham: Motion Hearing held on 1/12/2010 re 190 MOTION to Seal Documents and Close the Courtroom During Presentation of Confidential Material at Trial filed by Google, Inc., 359 SEALED MOTION to Strike the Deposition Errata Sheet of Mireya Bravomalo filed by Function Media, L.L.C., 332 MOTION Consolidate Argument on Motions to Exclude Expert Opinions re 329 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Certain Opinions of Function Media's Damages Expert Walter Bratic, 331 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Certain Expert Opinions MOTION Consolidate Argument on Motions to Exclude Expert Opinions re 329 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Certain Opinions of Function Media's Damages Expert Walter Bratic, 331 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Certain Expert Opinions filed by Function Media, L.L.C., 360 SEALED MOTION for Clarification Concerning Defense Exhibit 213 filed by Function Media, L.L.C.(Court Reporter Shelly Holmes.)(Attachments: #(1) sign-in sheet)(delat)
January 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 374 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of PRE-TRIAL HEARING held on 1/5/10 before Judge Chad Everingham. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR,Telephone number: (903) 663-5082. (118 pages)NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/5/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/16/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/15/2010. (tja, )
January 12, 2010 Opinion or Order ***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY Document # 372, Reply. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (SEE CORRECTED DOCUMENT # 373)(ch, )
January 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 373 ***REPLACES # 372 ***REPLY to Response to Motion re 359 SEALED MOTION to Strike the Deposition Errata Sheet of Mireya Bravomalo filed by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Tribble, Max) Modified on 1/12/2010 (ch, ).
January 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 372 ***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY SEE CORRECTED # 373. PLEASE IGNORE.***REPLY to Response to Motion re 359 SEALED MOTION to Strike the Deposition Errata Sheet of Mireya Bravomalo filed by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Tribble, Max) Modified on 1/12/2010 (ch, ).
January 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 371 SEALED SUR-REPLY to Motion re 331 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Certain Expert Opinions filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 13)(Candido, Amy)
January 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 370 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 360 SEALED MOTION for Clarification Concerning Defense Exhibit 213 filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Anderson, Carl)
January 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 369 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 359 SEALED MOTION to Strike the Deposition Errata Sheet of Mireya Bravomalo filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Candido, Amy)
January 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 368 ORDER granting 362 Motion for Extension of Time of Time of Eighteen Minutes to File Googles Opposition to Function Medias Motion to Exclude Certain Expert Opinions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 1/11/10. (ehs, )
January 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 367 Sealed Document - Supplement to Sealed Motion to Strike the Deposition Errata Sheet of Mireya Bravomalo (Dkt. 359). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Tribble, Max) Modified on 1/11/2010 (ch, ).
January 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 366 NOTICE of Hearing: Hearing on Google's Motion to Seal Documents and Close the Courtroom (Dkt. #190); Funcction Media's Motion to Exclude Certain Expert Opinions (Dkt. #331); Function Media's Sealed Motion to Strike the Deposition Errata Sheet of Mireya Bravomalo (Dkt. #359); and Function Media's Sealed Motion for Clarification Concerning Defense Exhibit 213 (Dkt. #360), set for 1/12/2010, 01:30 PM, in Mag Ctrm (Marshall) before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham.(delat)
January 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 365 MOTION to Expedite Motion for Adverse Inference Instruction Regarding Google's Destruction of Documents by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tribble, Max)
January 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 364 Emergency SEALED MOTION for Adverse Inference Instruction Regarding Google's Destruction of Evidence by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Text of Proposed Order)(Tribble, Max)
January 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 363 Joint MOTION to Expedite Hearing by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tribble, Max)
January 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 362 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 356 Sealed Response to Motion, by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Candido, Amy)
January 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 361 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 331 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Certain Expert Opinions filed by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Nos. 1-3)(Nelson, Justin)
January 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 360 SEALED MOTION for Clarification Concerning Defense Exhibit 213 by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Tribble, Max)
January 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 359 SEALED MOTION to Strike the Deposition Errata Sheet of Mireya Bravomalo by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Text of Proposed Order)(Tribble, Max)
January 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 358 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 356 Sealed Response to Motion,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B to Declaration of Ben Lee, # 2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Mireya Bravomalo - Part 1, # 3 Exhibit A to Declaration of Mireya Bravomalo - Part 2, # 4 Exhibit A to Declaration of Mireya Bravomalo - Part 3, # 5 Exhibit A to Declaration of Mireya Bravomalo - Part 4, # 6 Exhibit A to Declaration of Mireya Bravomalo - Part 5, # 7 Exhibit B to Declaration of Mireya Bravomalo)(Candido, Amy)
January 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 357 RESPONSE to Motion re 332 MOTION Consolidate Argument on Motions to Exclude Expert Opinions re 329 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Certain Opinions of Function Media's Damages Expert Walter Bratic, 331 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Certain Expert Opinions MOTION Consolidate Argument on Motions to Exclude Expert Opinions re 329 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Certain Opinions of Function Media's Damages Expert Walter Bratic, 331 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Certain Expert Opinions filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Candido, Amy)
January 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 356 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 331 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Certain Expert Opinions filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Bravomalo Declaration, # 13 Lee Declaration, # 14 Text of Proposed Order)(Candido, Amy)
January 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 355 ORDER - Regarding the jury trial in this case, scheduled to begin 1/19/2010 each side will have 15 hours to present its evidence. Such time is inclusive of direct examination of a partys witnesses and cross-examination of opposing witnesses, together with any deposition designations. Such time is exclusive of voir dire, opening statements, and final argument. Each side will have 40 minutes to make opening statements. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 1/7/2010. (ch, )
January 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 354 SEALED RESPONSE by Google, Inc. to 351 Function Media's Supplemental Notice on 329 Motion to Strike Acquisition Testimony (Other) filed by Google, Inc.. (Candido, Amy)
January 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 353 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham: Evidentiary Hearing held on 1/5/2010. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR.) (Attachments: # 1 Sign-in Sheet) (jml)
January 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 351 NOTICE by Function Media, L.L.C. re 344 Sealed Response to Motion, to Strike Acquisition Testimony (Nelson, Justin)
January 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 350 ORDER granting 347 Motion for entry of order regarding Adforce software files. The parties have resolved their dispute and have agreed that neither party will use this CD or the files it contains in any way at trial, and jointly move the Court for an Order excluding the use of these materials at trial. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 1/5/10. (ehs, )
January 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 352 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham: Jury Selection held on 1/4/2010. (Court Reporter Susan Simmons, CSR.) (jml)
January 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 349 SEALED RESPONSE to the Substantive Issues in Motion re 335 SEALED MOTION to Reconsider the Court's Denial of FM's Motion in Limine No. 47 filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Candido, Amy)
January 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 348 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 333 SEALED MOTION to Preclude Admission of Untimely Evidence filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Text of Proposed Order)(Candido, Amy)
January 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 347 Joint MOTION FOR ENTRY OF ORDER REGARDING ADFORCE SOFTWARE FILES by Function Media, L.L.C., Google, Inc.. (Candido, Amy) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/5/2010: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (ch, ).
January 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 346 ORDER granting 335 Motion to Reconsider Motion in Limine 47 (Dkt. No. 335) for purposes of voir dire only. At the January 5, 2010 evidentiary hearing, the court shall hear argument on whether to grant or deny Motion in Limine 47 for the remainder of the trial. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 1/4/10. (ehs, )
January 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 345 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 188 Sealed Motion; granting in part and denying in part 193 Sealed Motion; granting in part and denying in part 194 Sealed Motion; granting in part and denying in part 196 Sealed Motion; granting in part and denying in part 197 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 198 Sealed Motion; granting in part and denying in part 199 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 200 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 202 Sealed Motion; granting in part and denying in part 204 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 205 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 206 Motion in Limine. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 1/4/10. (ehs, )
December 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 344 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 329 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Certain Opinions of Function Media's Damages Expert Walter Bratic filed by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12)(Nelson, Justin)
December 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 343 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 334 Motion to Expedite. Argument on FMs motion will be heard at the exhibit hearing scheduled for January 5, 2010. The defendant Google, Inc. (Google) shall file a response to FMs motion to preclude prior to the evidentiary hearing.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 12/30/09. (ehs, )
December 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 342 ORDER granting 338 Motion for entry of order regarding conduct of expert depositions. Ruling set forth herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 12/29/09. (ehs, )
December 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 341 REPLY to Response to Motion re 334 MOTION to Expedite Consideration of Motion to Preclude Admission of Untimely Evidence filed by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Grinstein, Joseph)
December 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 340 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert M Parker on behalf of Function Media, L.L.C. (Parker, Robert)
December 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 339 RESPONSE in Opposition re 334 MOTION to Expedite Consideration of Motion to Preclude Admission of Untimely Evidence filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Candido, Amy)
December 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 338 Unopposed MOTION Entry of Order Regarding Conduct of Expert Depositions by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Grinstein, Joseph)
December 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 337 Additional Attachments to Main Document: 335 SEALED MOTION to Reconsider FM's Motion in Limine No. 47.. (Grinstein, Joseph)
December 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 336 Additional Attachments to Main Document: 333 SEALED MOTION to Preclude Admission of Untimely Evidence.. (Grinstein, Joseph)
December 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 335 SEALED MOTION to Reconsider FM's Motion in Limine No. 47 by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tribble, Max)
December 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 334 MOTION to Expedite Consideration of Motion to Preclude Admission of Untimely Evidence by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tribble, Max)
December 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 333 SEALED MOTION to Preclude Admission of Untimely Evidence by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Tribble, Max)
December 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 332 MOTION Consolidate Argument on Motions to Exclude Expert Opinions re 329 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Certain Opinions of Function Media's Damages Expert Walter Bratic, 331 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Certain Expert Opinions by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tribble, Max)
December 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 331 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Certain Expert Opinions by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L (part 1), # 13 Exhibit L (part 2), # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit N, # 16 Text of Proposed Order)(Tribble, Max)
December 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 330 ORDER granting 275 Motion to Compel Previously-Taken Deposition Testimony of Google Executives. Google to produce: (1) the deposition transcript plus any accompanying deposition exhibits of Eric Schmidt in the Viacom case; and (2) any other depositions in the Viacom case or otherwise that relate to the reasons why Google acquired a company in the advertising space. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 12/22/09. (ehs, )
December 18, 2009 Opinion or Order ***FILED IN ERROR. OVER PAGE LIMITS Document # 327, Sealed Motion to Exclude. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ATTY REFILED SEE DOCUMENT # 329)(ch, )
December 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 329 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Certain Opinions of Function Media's Damages Expert Walter Bratic by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5 part 1, # 6 Exhibit 5 part 2, # 7 Exhibit 5 part 3, # 8 Exhibit 5 part 4, # 9 Exhibit 5 part 5, # 10 Exhibit 6, # 11 Exhibit 7, # 12 Text of Proposed Order)(Candido, Amy)
December 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 328 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 327 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Certain Opinions of Function Media's Damages Expert Walter Bratic. (Attachments: Exhibit 5 (pt 1 of 5), # 1 Exhibit 5 (pt 2 of 5), # 2 Exhibit 5 (pt 3 of 5), # 3 Exhibit 5 (pt 4 of 5), # 4 Exhibit 5 (pt 5 of 5), # 5 Exhibit 6, # 6 Exhibit 7, # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Candido, Amy)
December 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 327 ***FILED IN ERROR. OVER THE PAGE LIMIT. PLEASE IGNORE. ATTY REFILED SEE # 329.*** SEALED MOTION to Exclude Certain Opinions of Function Media's Damages Expert Walter Bratic by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Candido, Amy) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/17/2009: # 5 Text of Proposed Order) (ch, ). Modified on 12/18/2009 (ch, ).
December 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 326 ORDER denying 321 Motion to Expedite briefing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 12/16/09. (ehs, )
December 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 325 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 207 Sealed Motion for summary judgment of noninfringement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 12/16/09. (ehs, )
December 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 324 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 201 Sealed Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 12/16/09. (ch, )
December 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 323 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 275 SEALED MOTION to Compel Previously-Taken Deposition Testimony of Google Executives filed by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Grinstein, Joseph)
December 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 322 RESPONSE in Opposition re 321 MOTION to Expedite Briefing and Consideration of Google's Daubert Motion to Exclude Certain Testimony and Opinions of Mr. Walter Bratic filed by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Grinstein, Joseph)
December 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 321 MOTION to Expedite Briefing and Consideration of Google's Daubert Motion to Exclude Certain Testimony and Opinions of Mr. Walter Bratic by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Candido, Amy)
December 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 320 ORDER denying 189 Sealed Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 12/11/09. (ch, )
December 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 319 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of PRE-TRIAL HEARING held on 12/4/09 before Judge Chad Everingham. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR,Telephone number: (903) 663-5082. (100 pgs.)NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/3/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/13/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/13/2010. (tja, )
December 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 318 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jessica Lea Hannah on behalf of Function Media, L.L.C. (Hannah, Jessica)
December 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 317 SEALED SURREPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 207 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement filed by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Tribble, Max)
December 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 316 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 275 SEALED MOTION to Compel Previously-Taken Deposition Testimony of Google Executives filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B)(Candido, Amy)
December 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 315 SEALED SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 201 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment on Validity of Patents filed by Google, Inc.. (DeFranco, Edward) Modified on 12/8/2009 (ch, ).
December 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 314 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 192 Dft Google Inc Motion to Limit the number of asserted claims. The plaintiff Function Media, L.L.C. shall limit the number of asserted claims for trial to a total of nine across both patents. The plaintiff shall notify the defendant by 12/11/09 at 12:00pm which patent claims it will assert at trial. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 12/7/09. (ch, )
December 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 313 ORDER granting 312 Googles Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadline For Googles Opposition To Function Medias Motion to Compel Previously-Taken Deposition Testimony. The deadline for Googles Opposition to Function Medias Motion to Compel Previously-Taken Deposition Testimony will be December 7, 2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 12/7/09. (ljw, )
December 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 312 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 275 SEALED MOTION to Compel Previously-Taken Deposition Testimony of Google Executives by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Candido, Amy)
December 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 311 ORDER granting 271 Sealed Motion to Compel Deposition of Google Executives. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 12/4/09. (ch, )
December 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 310 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 12/4/2009.(Court Reporter Shelly Holmes.)(Attachments: #(1) sign-in sheet)(delat)
December 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 309 NOTICE of Hearing: Hearing on pre-admission of exhibits and depo designations set for 1/5/2010, 09:00 AM, in Mag Ctrm (Marshall) before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham.(delat)
December 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 308 SEALED Notice of Corrected Exhibit to Main Document: 307 Sealed Response to Motion re 271 Supplemental SEALED MOTION to Compel Depositions of Google Executives. (Attachments: # 1 Corrected Exhibit C)(Candido, Amy)
December 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 307 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 271 Supplemental(SEALED MOTION to Compel Depositions of Google Executives Supplemental Motion to Compel filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I-1, # 10 Exhibit I-2)(Candido, Amy) (Clerk modified to link to 271 and not 272 per request from atty)Modified on 12/3/2009 (ch, ).
December 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 306 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 190 MOTION to Seal Documents and Close the Courtroom During Presentation of Confidential Material at Trial filed by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Burns, Warren)
December 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 305 ORDER granting 285 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 12/1/09. (ch, )
December 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 304 ORDER granting 286 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 190 MOTION to Seal Documents and Close the Courtroom During Presentation of Confidential Material at Trial Responses due by 12/1/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 12/1/09. (ch, )
December 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 303 ORDER granting 301 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 12/1/09. (ch, )
November 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 302 ***REPLACES # 290 ***Sealed Document. Notice of Filing of Declaration of Michael J. Wagner and Expert Report in Support of Replies to Googles Motions in Limine Nos. 3, 10 & 11. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michael J. Wagner, # 2 Exhibit A)(Candido, Amy) Modified on 12/1/2009 (ch, ).
November 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 301 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Function Media's Surreply to Google's Motion to Seal Documents and Close the Courtroom During Presentation of Confidential Information at Trial by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Burns, Warren)
November 30, 2009 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the 290 submitted NO CERTIFICATE OF AUTHORIZATION TO SEAL OR CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OR SIGNATURE PAGE. Correction should be made by one business day (ch, )
November 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 300 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 204 MOTION in Limine No. Three: Motion to Exclude Plaintiff from Asserting Any "Secondary Considerations" of Non-Obviousness filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Errata A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Candido, Amy)
November 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 299 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 193 SEALED MOTION in LImine No. 6: Motion to Preclude Evidence and Argument Regarding Credit for Invention of the Accused Products filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(DeFranco, Edward)
November 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 298 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 205 MOTION in Limine No. Two: Motion in Limine to Preclude Function Media from Introducing Evidence and Argument that Google Infringes the Asserted Claims Under the Doctrine of Equivalents filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Candido, Amy)
November 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 297 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 199 MOTION in Limine No. Eleven: Motion to Exclude Evidence of Google's Size, Wealth and Overall Revenues filed by Google, Inc.. (Perlson, David)
November 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 296 REPLY to Response to Motion re 197 MOTION in Limine No. Nine: Motion to Preclude Argument that Google Hindered Function Media or its Expert from Testing or Analyzing the Accused Products filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Revised [Proposed] Order)(DeFranco, Edward)
November 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 295 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 198 SEALED MOTION in Limine No. Ten: Motion to Exclude Allegations of Anticompetitive Activity on the Part of Google filed by Google, Inc.. (Perlson, David)
November 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 294 REPLY to Response to Motion re 200 MOTION in Limine No. Five: Motion to Admit Evidence Regarding the Reexamination of the Patents-In-Suit filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Part 1, # 2 Exhibit A Part 2)(Candido, Amy)
November 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 293 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 196 SEALED MOTION in Limine No. Eight: Motion to Preclude Evidence and Argument Relating to Google's Alleged Copying of the Invention filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(DeFranco, Edward)
November 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 292 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 194 SEALED MOTION in Limine No. 7: Motion to Exclude Evidence of Google's Independent Patent Activities filed by Google, Inc.. (DeFranco, Edward)
November 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 291 REPLY to Response to Motion re 206 MOTION in Limine No. One: Motion to Preclude Evidence and Argument Relating to The Parties' Conduct During Discovery filed by Google, Inc.. (Candido, Amy)
November 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 290 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT. NO SIGNATURE PAGE, AND NO CERTIFICATE OF AUTHORIZATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL AND NO CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. PLEASE IGNORE.***Sealed Document. Declaration of Michael J. Wagner (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Perlson, David) Modified on 11/30/2009 (ch, ).
November 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 289 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 207 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration and Expert Rebuttal Report of Mark Lanning, # 2 Appendices 1-7 to Expert Rebuttal Report of Mark Lanning, # 3 Exhibit 1 to Expert Rebuttal Report of Mark Lanning, # 4 Exhibit 2 to Expert Rebuttal Report of Mark Lanning, # 5 Exhibit 3 to Expert Rebuttal Report of Mark Lanning, # 6 Exhibits 4&5 to Expert Rebuttal Report of Mark Lanning)(DeFranco, Edward)
November 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 288 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 188 SEALED MOTION in Limine filed by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit C1, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F)(Tribble, Max)
November 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 287 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 201 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment on Validity of Patents filed by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit AA, # 2 Exhibit BB, # 3 Exhibit CC, # 4 Exhibit DD, # 5 Exhibit EE, # 6 Exhibit FF, # 7 Exhibit GG, # 8 Exhibit HH, # 9 Exhibit II, # 10 Exhibit JJ, # 11 Exhibit KK, # 12 Exhibit LL, # 13 Exhibit MM, # 14 Exhibit NN, # 15 Exhibit OO, # 16 Exhibit PP, # 17 Exhibit QQ)(Tribble, Max)
November 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 286 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 190 MOTION to Seal Documents and Close the Courtroom During Presentation of Confidential Material at Trial by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Burns, Warren)
November 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 285 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Grinstein, Joseph)
November 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 284 ORDER granting 281 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Juanita R Brooks and Thomas Bernard Walsh, IV terminated as counsel for Google, Inc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 11/24/09. (ch, )
November 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 283 ORDER granting 282 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Briefs in Support of Motion in Limine, Certain Dispositive Motion Reply Briefs and Rebuttal Expert Reports. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 11/24/09. (ch, )
November 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 282 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply Briefs in Support of Motions in Limine, Certain Dispositive Motion Reply Briefs, and Rebuttal Expert Reports by Function Media, L.L.C., Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Candido, Amy)
November 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 281 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wolff, Jason)
November 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 280 ***REPLACES DOCUMENT # 279 WHICH WAS FILED IN ERROR***SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 195 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment of No Inequitable Conduct filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Affidavit of James Glass, # 2 Exhibit N)(DeFranco, Edward) Modified on 11/23/2009 (ehs, ).
November 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 279 ***FILED IN ERROR. SEE CORRECTED DOCUMENT # 280 ***SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 195 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment of No Inequitable Conduct filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of James Glass, # 2 Exhibit N)(DeFranco, Edward) Modified on 11/23/2009 (ehs, ).
November 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 278 Sealed Document. Googles Notice of Correction to Googles Opposition To Function Media L.L.C.s Motion For Summary Judgment Of No Inequitable Conduct (Anderson, Carl)
November 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 277 ***REPLACES DOCUMENT # 276 WHICH WAS FILED IN ERROR***Sealed Document. Joint Final Pre-Trial Order (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B part 1, # 3 Exhibit B part 2, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I - part 1, # 11 Exhibit I - part 2, # 12 Exhibit J, # 13 Exhibit K, # 14 Exhibit L, # 15 Exhibit M, # 16 Exhibit N, # 17 Exhibit O, # 18 Exhibit P, # 19 Exhibit Q, # 20 Exhibit R)(Anderson, Carl) Modified on 11/23/2009 (ehs, ).
November 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 276 ***FILED IN ERROR. SEE CORRECTED DOCUMENT # 277 *** -DOCUMENT SEALED PER ATTORNEYS REQUEST***Proposed Pretrial Order by Function Media, L.L.C., Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B part 1, # 3 Exhibit B - part 2, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I - part 1, # 11 Exhibit I - part 2, # 12 Exhibit J, # 13 Exhibit K, # 14 Exhibit L, # 15 Exhibit M, # 16 Exhibit N, # 17 Exhibit O, # 18 Exhibit P, # 19 Exhibit Q, # 20 Exhibit R)(Anderson, Carl) Modified on 11/23/2009 (ehs, ). Modified on 11/23/2009 (ehs, ).
November 20, 2009 Opinion or Order ***Document # 273, Order modified to clarify deadlines*** (ehs, )
November 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 275 SEALED MOTION to Compel Previously-Taken Deposition Testimony of Google Executives by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Nos. 1-4, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Compel Previously-Taken Deposition Testimony)(Nelson, Justin)
November 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 274 ORDER granting 272 Motion to Expedite. Opening Brief: November 18, 2009 Responsive Brief: December 2, 2009. Hearing: December 4, 2009. The parties will not file any reply or surreply briefing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 11/19/09. (ehs, )
November 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 273 ORDER granting 270 Motion for Extension of Time to File Surreply. Google's Surreply in Opposition to Function Media's motion for Summary Judgment of No Inequitable Conduct due by 11/20/2009 Replies on Dispositive Motions and Motions in Limine due by 11/23/2009. Deadline for Function Media's Inequitable Conduct Expert Report due 11/25/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 11/19/09. (ehs, ) Modified on 11/20/2009 to clarify order text(ehs, ).
November 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 272 Agreed MOTION to Expedite Supplemental Motion to Compel by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Expedite)(Nelson, Justin)
November 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 271 Supplemental SEALED MOTION to Compel Depositions of Google Executives by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Nos. 1-9, # 2 Exhibit Nos. 10-21, # 3 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Compel)(Nelson, Justin)
November 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 270 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 201 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment on Validity of Patents, 195 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment of No Inequitable Conduct, 207 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement and Motions in Limine by Function Media, L.L.C., Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Candido, Amy)
November 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 269 ORDER granting 267 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages in its Reply in Support of its Motion to Seal Documents and Close the Courtroom during Presentation of Confidential Material at Trial. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 11/18/09. (ch, )
November 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 268 Sealed Document. Plaintiff's Notice of Correction to Plaintiff's Reply to Google's Opposition to Function Media's Motion for Summary Judgment of No Inequitable Conduct(Grinstein, Joseph)
November 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 267 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Google's Reply in support of its Motion to Seal Documents and Close the Courtroom During Presentation of Confidential Material at Trial by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Anderson, Carl)
November 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 266 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 190 MOTION to Seal Documents and Close the Courtroom During Presentation of Confidential Material at Trial filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit A in support, # 2 Affidavit B in support, # 3 Affidavit C in support)(Anderson, Carl)
November 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 265 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 201 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment on Validity of Patents, 207 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement and Motions in Limine by Function Media, L.L.C., Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Candido, Amy)
November 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 264 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 249 Sealed Additional Attachments to Main Document,,,,,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (corrected))(DeFranco, Edward)
November 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 263 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 243 Sealed Response to Motion,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit M (corrected))(DeFranco, Edward)
November 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 262 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 195 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment of No Inequitable Conduct filed by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Grinstein, Joseph)
November 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 261 ORDER granting 258 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply on its Motion to Seal Documents and Close the Courtroom During Presentation ofConfidential Material at Trial. Responses due by 11/16/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 11/6/09. (ehs, )
November 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 260 ORDER granting 257 Motion for Extension of Time to File Rebuttal Expert Witness Designations and Reports. Deadline extended to 11/24/09. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 11/6/09. (ehs, )
November 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/4/2009 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham. (ehs, )
November 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 259 ORDER granting 253 Motion to Continue the Final Pretrial Conference and Pre-Trial Deadlines. The Final Pretrial Conference is rescheduled from December 16, 2009, at 9:30 a.m., to December 4, 2009, at 9:30 a.m. The deadline for the parties to file their Joint Pretrial Order, Joint Proposed Jury Instructions and Form of the Verdict shall be November 20, 2009.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 11/6/09. (ehs, )
November 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 258 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 190 MOTION to Seal Documents and Close the Courtroom During Presentation of Confidential Material at Trial by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Anderson, Carl)
November 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 257 ***REPLACES # 254 & 256 ***Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Rebuttal Expert Witness Designations and Reports by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Joint Motion to Extend Deadline for Rebuttal Expert Witness Designations and Reports)(Salinas, Billie) Modified on 11/5/2009 (ch, ).
November 5, 2009 Opinion or Order ***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY Document # 256, Joint Motion for Extension. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (Attorney will refile)(ch, )
November 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 256 ***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY. PLEASE IGNORE.***Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Rebuttal Expert Witness Designations and Reports by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Joint Motion to Extend Deadline for Rebuttal Expert Witness Designations and Reports)(Salinas, Billie) Modified on 11/5/2009 (ch, ).
November 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 255 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 192 MOTION Motion to Limit the Number of Asserted Claims filed by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Grinstein, Joseph)
November 5, 2009 Opinion or Order ***FILED IN ERROR. FILED UNDER WRONG EVENT Document # 254, Joint Motion to Continue. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (Attorney needs to refile under correct event)(ch, )
November 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 254 ***FILED IN ERROR. FILED UNDER WRONG EVENT. PLEASE IGNORE.***Joint MOTION to Continue Deadline for Rebuttal Expert Witness Designations and Reports by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Joint Motion to Extend Deadlines for Rebuttal Expert Witness Designations and Reports)(Salinas, Billie) Modified on 11/5/2009 (ch, ).
November 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 253 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Reschedule the Final Pretrial Conference and Pretrial Deadlines by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Unopposed Motion to Reschedule Pretrial Conference and Pretrial Deadlines)(Salinas, Billie)
November 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 252 ORDER granting 238 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 11/4/09. (ehs, )
November 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 251 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 248 Sealed Response to Motion,. (Tribble, Max)
November 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 250 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 247 Sealed Response to Motion,,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - E30-1, # 2 Exhibit A - E30-2, # 3 Exhibit A - E30-3, # 4 Exhibit A - E30-4, # 5 Exhibit A - E31, # 6 Exhibit A - E32, # 7 Exhibit A - E33, # 8 Exhibit A - E34, # 9 Exhibit A - E35, # 10 Exhibit A - E36, # 11 Exhibit A - E37, # 12 Exhibit A - E38, # 13 Exhibit A - E39, # 14 Exhibit A - E40, # 15 Exhibit A - E41, # 16 Exhibit A - E42, # 17 Exhibit A - E43-1, # 18 Exhibit A - E43-2, # 19 Exhibit A - E43-3, # 20 Exhibit A - E43-4, # 21 Exhibit A - E43-5, # 22 Exhibit A - E44, # 23 Exhibit A - E45-1, # 24 Exhibit A - E45-2, # 25 Exhibit A - E45-3, # 26 Exhibit A - E45-4, # 27 Exhibit A - E46-1, # 28 Exhibit A - E46-2, # 29 Exhibit A - E46-3, # 30 Exhibit A - E46-4, # 31 Exhibit A - E46-5, # 32 Exhibit A - E46-6, # 33 Exhibit A - E46-7, # 34 Exhibit A - E46-8, # 35 Exhibit A - E46-9, # 36 Exhibit A - E47, # 37 Exhibit A - E48, # 38 Exhibit A - E49, # 39 Exhibit A - E50, # 40 Exhibit A - E51, # 41 Exhibit A - E52, # 42 Exhibit A - E53, # 43 Exhibit A - E54, # 44 Exhibit A - E55, # 45 Exhibit A - E56, # 46 Exhibit A - E57, # 47 Exhibit A - E58, # 48 Exhibit A - E59, # 49 Exhibit A - E60, # 50 Exhibit A - E61)(DeFranco, Edward)
November 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 249 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 247 Sealed Response to Motion,,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - App. 1, # 2 Exhibit A - App. 2, # 3 Exhibit A - App. 3, # 4 Exhibit A - App. 4, # 5 Exhibit A - App. 5, # 6 Exhibit A - App. 6, # 7 Exhibit A - App. 7, # 8 Exhibit A - App. 8, # 9 Exhibit A - App. 9, # 10 Exhibit A - App. 10, # 11 Exhibit A - App. 11, # 12 Exhibit A - App. 12, # 13 Exhibit A - App. 13, # 14 Exhibit A - App. 14, # 15 Exhibit A - App. 15, # 16 Exhibit A - App. 16, # 17 Exhibit A - E1, # 18 Exhibit A - E2, # 19 Exhibit A - E3, # 20 Exhibit A - E4, # 21 Exhibit A - E5, # 22 Exhibit A - E6, # 23 Exhibit A - E7, # 24 Exhibit A - E8, # 25 Exhibit A - E9, # 26 Exhibit A - E10, # 27 Exhibit A - E11, # 28 Exhibit A - E12, # 29 Exhibit A - E13-1, # 30 Exhibit A - E13-2, # 31 Exhibit A - E13-3, # 32 Exhibit A - E13-4, # 33 Exhibit A - E14, # 34 Exhibit A - E15, # 35 Exhibit A - E16, # 36 Exhibit A - E17, # 37 Exhibit A - E18, # 38 Exhibit A - E19, # 39 Exhibit A - E20, # 40 Exhibit A - E21, # 41 Exhibit A - E22, # 42 Exhibit A - E23, # 43 Exhibit A - E24, # 44 Exhibit A - E25, # 45 Exhibit A - E26, # 46 Exhibit A - E27, # 47 Exhibit A - E28, # 48 Exhibit A - E29)(DeFranco, Edward)
November 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 248 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 204 MOTION in Limine No. Three: Motion to Exclude Plaintiff from Asserting Any "Secondary Considerations" of Non-Obviousness filed by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex. B, # 2 Exhibit Ex. C, # 3 Exhibit Ex. D, # 4 Exhibit Ex. E, # 5 Exhibit Ex. F, # 6 Text of Proposed Order)(Grinstein, Joseph)
November 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 247 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 201 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment on Validity of Patents filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit Declaration of James Glass, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Errata G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit N (part 1 of 2), # 16 Exhibit N (part 2 of 2), # 17 Exhibit O (part 1 of 7), # 18 Exhibit O (part 2 of 7), # 19 Exhibit O (part 3 of 7), # 20 Exhibit O (part 4 of 7), # 21 Exhibit O (part 5 of 7), # 22 Exhibit O (part 6 of 7), # 23 Exhibit O (part 7 of 7))(DeFranco, Edward)
November 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 246 RESPONSE to Motion re 200 MOTION in Limine No. Five: Motion to Admit Evidence Regarding the Reexamination of the Patents-In-Suit filed by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Grinstein, Joseph)
November 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 245 RESPONSE to Motion re 206 MOTION in Limine No. One: Motion to Preclude Evidence and Argument Relating to The Parties' Conduct During Discovery filed by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Grinstein, Joseph)
November 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 244 RESPONSE to Motion re 193 SEALED MOTION in LImine No. 6: Motion to Preclude Evidence and Argument Regarding Credit for Invention of the Accused Products filed by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Grinstein, Joseph)
November 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 243 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 195 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment of No Inequitable Conduct filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of James Glass, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Text of Proposed Order)(Candido, Amy)
November 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 242 RESPONSE to Motion re 202 SEALED MOTION in Limine No. Four: Motion To Preclude Evidence and Argument Regarding Function Media's Allegations of Willful Infringement filed by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Grinstein, Joseph)
November 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 241 RESPONSE to Motion re 189 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment That Any Alleged Infringement of U.S. Patent Nos. 6,446,045, 7,240,025, and 7,249,059 Was Not Willful filed by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Grinstein, Joseph)
November 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 240 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 188 SEALED MOTION in Limine filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Text of Proposed Order)(Candido, Amy)
November 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 239 RESPONSE to Motion re 197 MOTION in Limine No. Nine: Motion to Preclude Argument that Google Hindered Function Media or its Expert from Testing or Analyzing the Accused Products filed by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Grinstein, Joseph)
November 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 238 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motions in Limine by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Candido, Amy)
November 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 237 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 205 MOTION in Limine No. Two: Motion in Limine to Preclude Function Media from Introducing Evidence and Argument that Google Infringes the Asserted Claims Under the Doctrine of Equivalents filed by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex. 1, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Grinstein, Joseph)
November 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 236 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 207 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement filed by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Jeremy Brandon, # 2 Exhibit Ex. A to Brandon Decl., # 3 Exhibit Ex. B to Brandon Decl., # 4 Exhibit Ex. C to Brandon Decl., # 5 Exhibit Ex. D to Brandon Decl., # 6 Exhibit Ex. 1 to Rhyne Decl., # 7 Exhibit Ex. E to Brandon Decl., # 8 Exhibit Ex. F to Brandon Decl., # 9 Exhibit Ex. G to Brandon Decl., # 10 Exhibit Ex. H to Brandon Decl., # 11 Exhibit Ex. I to Brandon Decl., # 12 Text of Proposed Order)(Grinstein, Joseph)
November 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 235 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 194 SEALED MOTION in Limine No. 7: Motion to Exclude Evidence of Google's Independent Patent Activities filed by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex. A-1, # 2 Exhibit Ex. A-2, # 3 Exhibit Ex. B-1, # 4 Exhibit Ex. B-2, # 5 Exhibit Ex. C, # 6 Exhibit Ex. D-1, # 7 Exhibit Ex. D-2, # 8 Exhibit Ex. E, # 9 Exhibit Ex. F, # 10 Exhibit Ex. G, # 11 Text of Proposed Order)(Grinstein, Joseph)
November 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 234 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 196 SEALED MOTION in Limine No. Eight: Motion to Preclude Evidence and Argument Relating to Google's Alleged Copying of the Invention filed by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Grinstein, Joseph)
November 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 233 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 198 SEALED MOTION in Limine No. Ten: Motion to Exclude Allegations of Anticompetitive Activity on the Part of Google, 199 MOTION in Limine No. Eleven: Motion to Exclude Evidence of Google's Size, Wealth and Overall Revenues filed by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex. A, # 2 Exhibit Ex. B, # 3 Exhibit Ex. C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Grinstein, Joseph)
October 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 232 REPLY to Response to Motion re 192 MOTION Motion to Limit the Number of Asserted Claims filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Salinas, Billie)
October 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 231 ORDER granting 230 Motion for Extension of Pretrial Deadlines. Deadlines are extended as set forth herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 10/26/09. (ch, )
October 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 230 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Pre-Trial Deadlines by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Candido, Amy)
October 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 229 ORDER granting 227 Motion for Extension of Time to File Joint Pretrial Order, Joint Proposed Jury Instructions and Form of the Verdict to October 23, 2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 10/23/09. (ehs, )
October 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 228 NOTICE of Hearing: Jury Selection set for 1/4/2010, 09:00 AM, in Mag Ctrm (Marshall) before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham. Jury Trial set for 1/19/2010, 08:30 AM, in Mag Ctrm (Marshall) before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham. Pretrial Conference set for 12/16/2009, 09:30 AM, in Mag Ctrm (Marshall) before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham.(delat)
October 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 227 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Pretrial Order, Joint Proposed Jury Instructions and Form of the Verdict by Function Media, L.L.C., Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Anderson, Carl)
October 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 226 NOTICE by Google, Inc. OF POTENTIAL SCHEDULING CONFLICT (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Anderson, Carl)
October 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 225 RESPONSE to Motion re 190 MOTION to Seal Documents and Close the Courtroom During Presentation of Confidential Material at Trial filed by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Burns, Warren)
October 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 224 RESPONSE to Motion re 192 MOTION Motion to Limit the Number of Asserted Claims filed by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex. A, # 2 Exhibit Ex. B, # 3 Exhibit Ex. C, # 4 Exhibit Ex. D, # 5 Exhibit Ex. E)(Grinstein, Joseph)
October 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 223 NOTICE by Google, Inc. GOOGLE INC.S RESPONSES AND OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF'S PRE-TRIAL DISCLOSURES (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Salinas, Billie)
October 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 222 NOTICE by Function Media, L.L.C. Function Media's Counter-Designations and Objections to Google's Deposition Designations (Tribble, Max)
October 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 221 NOTICE by Function Media, L.L.C. Objections to Google's Trial Exhibits (Tribble, Max)
October 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 220 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Warren Burns on behalf of Function Media, L.L.C. (Burns, Warren)
October 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 219 ORDER - taking under advisement 120 Motion for Protective Order; granting 133 Sealed Motion to Compel; denying 146 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; granting in part and denying in part 153 Motion to Expedite; granting 180 Sealed Motion to Preclude depositions; denying 181 Sealed Motion for leave to take depositions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 10/9/09. (ch, )
October 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 218 MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER regarding the claim construction issues. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 10/9/09. (ehs, )
October 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 217 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 180 SEALED MOTION to Preclude Depositions and/or Quash Deposition Subpoenas to Intellectual Ventures and Elizabeth Holohan filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Text of Proposed Order)(Anderson, Carl)
October 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 216 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 8/25/09 Markman Hearing before Judge Chad Everingham. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Judy Werlinger, CSR,Telephone number: 979/595-5222. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 10/28/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/9/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/5/2010. (lss, )
October 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 215 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 181 SEALED MOTION for Leave to Depose filed by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I)(Tribble, Max)
October 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ORDER granting 213 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 10/6/09. (ch, )
October 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 213 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Applicable to Docket No. 188 by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Grinstein, Joseph)
October 5, 2009 Opinion or Order ***FILED IN ERROR. ORDER FILED AS A SEPARATE DOCUMENT Document # 212, Additional Attachments. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
October 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 212 ***FILED IN ERROR. ORDERS ARE NOT FILED AS SEPARATE DOCUMENT. PLEASE IGNORE.***SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 207 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement. (Anderson, Carl) Modified on 10/5/2009 (ch, ).
October 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 211 NOTICE by Google, Inc. of Trial Transcript (Salinas, Billie)
October 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 210 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 207 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit O part 2, # 2 Exhibit O part 3, # 3 Exhibit P part 1, # 4 Exhibit P part 2, # 5 Exhibit Q, # 6 Exhibit R, # 7 Exhibit S)(Anderson, Carl)
October 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 209 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 207 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit G, # 2 Exhibit H part 1, # 3 Exhibit H part 2, # 4 Exhibit I, # 5 Exhibit J, # 6 Exhibit K, # 7 Exhibit L, # 8 Exhibit M, # 9 Exhibit N)(Anderson, Carl)
October 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 208 NOTICE by Function Media, L.L.C. Notice of Trial Transcript (Grinstein, Joseph)
October 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 207 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D part 1, # 5 Exhibit D part 2, # 6 Exhibit D part 3, # 7 Exhibit E part 1, # 8 Exhibit E part 2, # 9 Exhibit E part 3, # 10 Affidavit of Patrick D. Curran in Support of Googles Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement)(Anderson, Carl) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/5/2009: # 11 Text of Proposed Order) (ch, ).
October 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 206 MOTION in Limine No. One: Motion to Preclude Evidence and Argument Relating to The Parties' Conduct During Discovery by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion in Limine No. One: Motion to Preclude Evidence and Argument Relating to the Parties' Conduct During Discovery)(Salinas, Billie)
October 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 205 MOTION in Limine No. Two: Motion in Limine to Preclude Function Media from Introducing Evidence and Argument that Google Infringes the Asserted Claims Under the Doctrine of Equivalents by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, Part 1, # 4 Exhibit C, Part 2, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Text of Proposed Order Granting Google's Motion in Limine No. Two: Motion to Preclude Function Media From Introducing Evidence and Argument That Google Infringes the Asserted Claims Under the Doctrine of Equivalents)(Salinas, Billie)
October 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 204 MOTION in Limine No. Three: Motion to Exclude Plaintiff from Asserting Any "Secondary Considerations" of Non-Obviousness by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Google's Motion in Limine No. Three: Motion to Exclude Plaintiff From Asserting Any "Secondary Considerations" of Non-Obviousness)(Salinas, Billie)
October 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 203 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 201 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment on Validity of Patents. (Attachments: Exhibit E # 1 Exhibit F, # 2 Exhibit G, # 3 Exhibit H, # 4 Exhibit I, # 5 Exhibit J, # 6 Exhibit K, # 7 Exhibit L, # 8 Text of Proposed Order)(Grinstein, Joseph)
October 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 202 SEALED MOTION in Limine No. Four: Motion To Preclude Evidence and Argument Regarding Function Media's Allegations of Willful Infringement by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Text of Proposed Order Granting Google's Motion in Limine No. Four: Motion to Preclude Evidence And Argument Regarding Function Media's Allegations of Willful Infringement)(Salinas, Billie)
October 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 201 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment on Validity of Patents by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Sandeep Seth in Support of MSJ, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D-1, # 6 Exhibit D-2, # 7 Exhibit D-3, # 8 Exhibit D-4, # 9 Exhibit D-5, # 10 Exhibit D-6, # 11 Exhibit D-7, # 12 Exhibit D-8, # 13 Exhibit D-9, # 14 Exhibit D-10, # 15 Errata D-11, # 16 Exhibit D-12, # 17 Exhibit D-13, # 18 Exhibit D-14, # 19 Exhibit D-15, # 20 Exhibit D-16, # 21 Exhibit D-17, # 22 Exhibit D-18, # 23 Exhibit D-19, # 24 Exhibit D-20, # 25 Exhibit D-21, # 26 Exhibit D-22, # 27 Exhibit D-23, # 28 Exhibit D-24, # 29 Exhibit D-25, # 30 Exhibit D)(Grinstein, Joseph) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/5/2009: # 31 Text of Proposed Order) (ch, ).
October 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 200 MOTION in Limine No. Five: Motion to Admit Evidence Regarding the Reexamination of the Patents-In-Suit by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Text of Proposed Order Granting Google's Motion in Limine No. Five: Motion to Admit Evidence Regarding the Reexamination of the Patents-in-Suit)(Salinas, Billie)
October 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 199 MOTION in Limine No. Eleven: Motion to Exclude Evidence of Google's Size, Wealth and Overall Revenues by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Google's Motion in Limine No. Eleven: Motion to Exclude Evidence of Google's Size, Wealth and Overall Revenues)(Salinas, Billie)
October 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 198 SEALED MOTION in Limine No. Ten: Motion to Exclude Allegations of Anticompetitive Activity on the Part of Google by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Google's Motion in Limine No. Ten: Motion to Exclude Allegations of Anticompetitive Activity on the Part of Google)(Salinas, Billie)
October 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 197 MOTION in Limine No. Nine: Motion to Preclude Argument that Google Hindered Function Media or its Expert from Testing or Analyzing the Accused Products by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Google's Motion in Limine No. Nine: Motion to Preclude Argument that Google Hindered Function Media or its Expert from Testing or Analyzing the Accused Products)(Salinas, Billie)
October 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 196 SEALED MOTION in Limine No. Eight: Motion to Preclude Evidence and Argument Relating to Google's Alleged Copying of the Invention by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Text of Proposed Order Granting Google's Motion in Limine No. Eight: Motion to Preclude Evidence and Argument Relating to Google's Alleged Copying of the Invention)(Salinas, Billie)
October 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 195 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment of No Inequitable Conduct by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A, # 2 Appendix B, # 3 Affidavit of Joseph Grinstein in Support of MSJ, # 4 Exhibit A, # 5 Exhibit B-1, # 6 Exhibit B-2, # 7 Exhibit C-1, # 8 Exhibit C-2, # 9 Exhibit D, # 10 Exhibit E, # 11 Exhibit F, # 12 Exhibit G, # 13 Text of Proposed Order)(Grinstein, Joseph)
October 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 194 SEALED MOTION in Limine No. 7: Motion to Exclude Evidence of Google's Independent Patent Activities by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Text of Proposed Order Granting Google's Motion in Limine No. Seven: Motion to Exclude Evidence of Google's Independent Patent Activities)(Salinas, Billie)
October 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 193 SEALED MOTION in LImine No. 6: Motion to Preclude Evidence and Argument Regarding Credit for Invention of the Accused Products by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Defendant Google, Inc.'s Motion in Limine No. 6: Motion to Preclude Evidence and Argument Regarding Credit for Invention of the Accused Products)(Salinas, Billie)
October 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 192 MOTION Motion to Limit the Number of Asserted Claims by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Salinas, Billie) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/5/2009: # 5 Text of Proposed Order) (ehs, ).
October 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 191 NOTICE by Google, Inc. Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. Section 282 (Anderson, Carl)
October 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 190 MOTION to Seal Documents and Close the Courtroom During Presentation of Confidential Material at Trial by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Anderson, Carl)
October 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 189 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment That Any Alleged Infringement of U.S. Patent Nos. 6,446,045, 7,240,025, and 7,249,059 Was Not Willful by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit In Support of Google, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment That Any Alleged Infringement of U.S. Patent Nos. 6,446,045, 7,240,025 and 7,249,059 Was Not Willful, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit N, # 16 Text of Proposed Order Granting Defendant Google, Inc.'s Motion For Summary Judgment that Any Alleged Infringement of U.S. Patent Nos. 6,446,045, 7,240,025, and 7,249,059 Was Not Willful)(Salinas, Billie)
October 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 188 SEALED MOTION in Limine by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Tribble, Max) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/5/2009: # 3 Text of Proposed Order) (ch, ).
October 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 187 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Patrick Curran for Google, Inc.. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-1- 4946)(ehs, )
September 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 186 Additional Attachments to Main Document: 183 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Supplement to Motion to Compel (dkt 133).. (Nelson, Justin)
September 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 185 Google's Sur-Reply in Opposition to Function Media's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Regarding Google's Inequitable Conduct Allegations SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 146 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Regarding Google's Inequitable Conduct Allegations filed by Google, Inc.. (Gillam, Harry)
September 29, 2009 Opinion or Order NOTICE of DEFICIENCY regarding the #184 Sealed Surreply submitted by Google, Inc.. No cert of authority to seal. Correction should be made by 1 business day and refiled. (sm, )
September 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT, PLEASE IGNORE.***Google's Sur-Reply in Opposition to Function Media's Motion for Judgement on the Pleadings Regarding Google's Inequitable Conduct Allegations SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 146 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Regarding Google's Inequitable Conduct Allegations filed by Google, Inc.. (Gillam, Harry) Modified on 9/29/2009 (sm, ).
September 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 183 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Supplement to Motion to Compel (dkt 133) by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (supplemental brief), # 2 Exhibit A (to supplemental brief), # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Justin)
September 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER granting 178 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 9/22/09. (ehs, )
September 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 181 SEALED MOTION for Leave to Depose by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit in Support, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Text of Proposed Order)(Anderson, Carl)
September 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ***REPLACES # 179 *** SEALED MOTION to Preclude Depositions and/or Quash Deposition Subpoenas to Intellectual Ventures and Elizabeth Holohan by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Text of Proposed Order)(Tribble, Max) Modified on 9/21/2009 (ch, ).
September 21, 2009 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the 179 submitted by Function Media, L.L.C.. NO CERTIFICATE OF AUTHORIZATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL. Correction should be made by one business day (ch, )
September 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT. NO CERTIFICATE OF AUTHORIZATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL.*** SEALED MOTION to Preclude Depositions and/or Quash Deposition Subpoenas to Intellectual Ventures and Elizabeth Holohan by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Text of Proposed Order)(Tribble, Max) Modified on 9/21/2009 (ch, ).
September 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 178 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Joint Motion to Extend)(Nelson, Justin)
September 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 177 NOTICE of Disclosure by Function Media, L.L.C. re Plaintiff's Witness Disclosure (Nelson, Justin)
September 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 176 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 146 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Regarding Google's Inequitable Conduct Allegations filed by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Grinstein, Joseph)
September 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 175 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 146 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Regarding Google's Inequitable Conduct Allegations Google's Opposition to Function Media's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Regarding Google's Inequitable Conduct Allegations filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Supplemental Responses to Interrogatories)(Gillam, Harry)
September 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER granting 173 Motion for Extension of Time to File; granting 173 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to pltf's motion for judgment on the pleadings regarding Gogle's Inequitable Conduct Allegations( Responses due by 9/15/2009). Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 9/15/09. (ehs, )
September 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 173 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File, MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 146 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Regarding Google's Inequitable Conduct Allegations by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gillam, Harry)
September 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER granting 171 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply ( Responses due by 9/11/2009). Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 9/8/09. (ehs, )
September 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 171 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File, MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 146 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Regarding Google's Inequitable Conduct Allegations by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gillam, Harry)
August 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 170 REPLY to Response to Motion re 120 MOTION for Protective Order to Preclude Depositions regarding Notice of Supplemental Authority filed by Google, Inc.. (Anderson, Carl)
August 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER denying 162 Motion to Expedite; granting 167 Motion to Withdraw. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on August 31, 2009. (jml)
August 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 168 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Deborah J Race on behalf of Function Media, L.L.C. (Race, Deborah)
August 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ***REPLACES # 166 ***Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw 162 MOTION to Expedite Emergency Motion to Set Deadline for Google to Complete Production and Relief from Meet and Confer, 161 Sealed Additional Attachments to Main Document, 160 Emergency MOTION To Set Deadline for Google to Complete Production and Relief from Meet and Confer by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Withdraw Emergency Motion)(Nelson, Justin) Modified on 8/31/2009 (ch, ).
August 31, 2009 Opinion or Order ***FILED IN ERROR. ATTORNEY MUST FILE A MOTION TO WITHDRAW Document # 166, Notice. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
August 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ***FILED IN ERROR. ATTORNEY MUST FILE A MOTION. PLEASE IGNORE.NOTICE by Function Media, L.L.C. re 160 Emergency MOTION To Set Deadline for Google to Complete Production and Relief from Meet and Confer to Withdraw Emergency Motion (Nelson, Justin) Modified on 8/31/2009 (ch, ).
August 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 165 RESPONSE to Motion re 120 MOTION for Protective Order to Preclude Depositions "Response to Supplemental Authority on Protective Order" filed by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Nelson, Justin)
August 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 164 NOTICE by Google, Inc. re 120 MOTION for Protective Order to Preclude Depositions of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Anderson, Carl)
August 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 163 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Billie D Salinas for Google, Inc.. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-1-4886) (ehs, )
August 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 162 MOTION to Expedite Emergency Motion to Set Deadline for Google to Complete Production and Relief from Meet and Confer by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Justin)
August 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 161 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 160 Emergency MOTION To Set Deadline for Google to Complete Production and Relief from Meet and Confer. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Nelson, Justin)
August 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 160 Emergency MOTION To Set Deadline for Google to Complete Production and Relief from Meet and Confer by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A-D filed separately under seal, # 3 Exhibit E, # 4 Exhibit F, # 5 Exhibit G, # 6 Exhibit H, # 7 Exhibit I, # 8 Exhibit J, # 9 Exhibit K, # 10 Exhibit L)(Nelson, Justin)
August 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 159 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham: Markman Hearing held on 8/25/2009. (Court Reporter Judy Werlinger, CSR.) (Attachments: # 1 Sign-in Sheet) (jml)
August 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ***REPLACES # 154 ***RESPONSE in Opposition re 153 Second MOTION to Expedite Motion to Compel filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit in Support of Opposition to Function Media's Second Expedited Motion to Compel, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Text of Proposed Order)(Anderson, Carl) Modified on 8/24/2009 (ch, ).
August 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 157 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 133 SEALED MOTION to Compel (Extradited) SEALED MOTION to Compel (Extradited) filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Anderson, Carl)
August 24, 2009 Opinion or Order ***FILED IN ERROR. ORDERS ARE NOT FILED AS A SEPARATE DOCUMENT Document # 156, Additional Attachments. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
August 24, 2009 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the 154 submitted by Google, Inc.. No Ceritificate of Service.. Correction should be made by one business day (ch, )
August 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ***FILED IN ERROR. ORDERS ARE NOT FILED AS SEPARATE DOCUMENTS.***Additional Attachments to Main Document: 154 Response in Opposition to Motion.. (Anderson, Carl) Modified on 8/24/2009 (ch, ).
August 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 155 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re 153 Second MOTION to Expedite Motion to Compel filed by Google, Inc.. (Anderson, Carl)
August 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT. NO CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. PLEASE IGNORE.***RESPONSE in Opposition re 153 Second MOTION to Expedite Motion to Compel filed by Google, Inc.. (Anderson, Carl) Modified on 8/24/2009 (ch, ).
August 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 153 Second MOTION to Expedite Motion to Compel by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Justin)
August 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 150 Unopposed MOTION to Expedite Second Motion to Compel by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Justin)
August 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 152 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney James M Glass for Google, Inc.. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-1-4872(ch, )
August 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 151 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Edward J DeFranco for Google, Inc. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-1-4872. (ch, )
August 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 149 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 133 SEALED MOTION to Compel (Expedited) SEALED MOTION to Compel (Expedited) filed by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10)(Nelson, Justin) Modified on 8/18/2009 (poa, ).
August 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 148 NOTICE by Function Media, L.L.C. re 110 Reply to Claim Construction Brief Notice of Supplemental Authority for Function Media's Markman Briefs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Grinstein, Joseph)
August 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 147 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 120 MOTION for Protective Order to Preclude Depositions filed by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9)(Nelson, Justin)
August 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 146 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Regarding Google's Inequitable Conduct Allegations by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Grinstein, Joseph)
August 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 145 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 133 SEALED MOTION to Compel (Expedited) SEALED MOTION to Compel (Expedited) filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Anderson in Support, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Text of Proposed Order)(Anderson, Carl) Modified on 8/18/2009 (poa, ). Modified
August 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 144 NOTICE by Google, Inc. of Substitution of Lead Trial Counsel (Karas, Stan)
August 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 143 NOTICE by Google, Inc. re 98 Claim Construction Brief, of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Anderson, Carl)
August 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 142 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 120 MOTION for Protective Order to Preclude Depositions filed by Google, Inc.. (Anderson, Carl)
August 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 141 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sandeep Seth on behalf of all plaintiffs (Seth, Sandeep)
July 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER granting 138 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Parties shall submit their joint P.R. 4-5(d) chart to the Court by August 14, 2009 and their tutorials on DVD to the court by August 17, 2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/31/09. (ehs, )
July 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER granting 121 Motion to Expedite briefing. In light of the re-scheduling of the claim construction hearing for August 25, 2009, the court sets the following briefing schedule for the motion to compel (Dkt. No. 133). Response Due: August 12, 2009. Reply Due: August 18, 2009. Sur-Reply Due: August 24, 2009 at 12:00 p.m. The court will hear oral argument on Google, Inc.s motion for a protective order (Dkt. No. 120) and Function Medias motion to compel (Dkt. No. 133) at the conclusion of the claim construction hearing. Each side will be given 20 minutes to argue its respective position. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/31/09. (ehs, )
July 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 138 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File P.R. 4-5(d) Chart and Technical Tutorials by Function Media, L.L.C., Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Anderson, Carl)
July 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 137 NOTICE of Hearing: Markman Hearing RESET for 8/25/2009, 09:00 AM, in Mag Ctrm (Marshall) before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham.(delat)
July 29, 2009 Opinion or Order ***FILED IN ERROR. NO CERTIFICATE OF AUTHORIZATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL - Document # 129, 130, 131, 132, Sealed Motion to Compel, Sealed Response, Sealed Additional Attachments. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ATTORNEY HAS REFILED SEE CORRECTED DOCUMENT'S # 133, 134, 135, 136 )(ch, )
July 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ***REPLACES # 125 AND 132 ***SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 134 Sealed Response to Motion,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 8 -part 1, # 2 Exhibit 8 - part 2, # 3 Exhibit 20, # 4 Exhibit 21, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Justin) Modified on 7/29/2009 (ch, ).
July 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ***REPLACES # 124 AND 131 ***SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 134 Sealed Response to Motion,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 7, # 2 Exhibit 9, # 3 Exhibit 10, # 4 Exhibit 11, # 5 Exhibit 12, # 6 Exhibit 13, # 7 Exhibit 14, # 8 Exhibit 15, # 9 Exhibit 16, # 10 Exhibit 17, # 11 Exhibit 18, # 12 Exhibit 19)(Nelson, Justin) Modified on 7/29/2009 (ch, ).
July 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ***REPLACES # 123 AND 130 ***SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 120 MOTION for Protective Order to Preclude Depositions filed by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6)(Nelson, Justin) Modified on 7/29/2009 (ch, ).
July 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ***REPLACES # 122 AND 129 *** SEALED MOTION to Compel (Expedited) by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Justin) Modified on 7/29/2009 (ch, ). Modified on 8/18/2009 (poa, ).
July 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE. SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 130 Sealed Response to Motion,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 8 -part 1, # 2 Exhibit 8 -part 2, # 3 Exhibit 20, # 4 Exhibit 21, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Justin) Modified on 7/29/2009 (ch, ).
July 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE.***SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 130 Sealed Response to Motion,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 7, # 2 Exhibit 9, # 3 Exhibit 10, # 4 Exhibit 11, # 5 Exhibit 12, # 6 Exhibit 13, # 7 Exhibit 14, # 8 Exhibit 15, # 9 Exhibit 16, # 10 Exhibit 17, # 11 Exhibit 18, # 12 Exhibit 19)(Nelson, Justin) Modified on 7/29/2009 (ch, ).
July 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE.***SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 120 MOTION for Protective Order to Preclude Depositions filed by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6)(Nelson, Justin) Modified on 7/29/2009 (ch, ).
July 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE.*** SEALED MOTION to Compel (Expedited) by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Justin) Modified on 7/29/2009 (ch, ).
July 28, 2009 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the 124 and 125 submitted by Function Media, L.L.C.. No Certificate of Authorization to file under seal. Correction should be made by 7/28/09 (ch, )
July 28, 2009 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the 123 submitted by Function Media, L.L.C.. No Certificate of Authorization to file under Seal. Correction should be made by 7/28/09 (ch, )
July 28, 2009 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the 122 submitted by Function Media, L.L.C.. No Certificate of Authorization. Correction should be made by 7/28/09 (ch, )
July 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT. NO CERTIFICATE OF AUTHORIZATION.***SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 123 Sealed Response to Motion, 124 Sealed Additional Attachments to Main Document,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 8 part 1, # 2 Exhibit 8 part 2, # 3 Exhibit 20, # 4 Exhibit 21, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Justin) Modified on 7/28/2009 (ch, ).
July 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT. NO CERTIFICATE OF AUTHORIZATION TO SEAL. PLEASE IGNORE.***SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 123 Sealed Response to Motion,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 7, # 2 Exhibit 9, # 3 Exhibit 10, # 4 Exhibit 11, # 5 Exhibit 12, # 6 Exhibit 13, # 7 Exhibit 14, # 8 Exhibit 15, # 9 Exhibit 16, # 10 Exhibit 17, # 11 Exhibit 18, # 12 Exhibit 19)(Nelson, Justin) Modified on 7/28/2009 (ch, ).
July 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT. NO CERTIFICATE OF AUTHORIZATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL. PLEASE IGNORE. ***SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 120 MOTION for Protective Order to Preclude Depositions filed by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6)(Nelson, Justin) Modified on 7/28/2009 (ch, ).
July 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT. NO CERTIFICATE OF AUTHORIZATION. PLEASE IGNORE.*** SEALED MOTION to Compel (Expedited) by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Justin) Modified on 7/28/2009 (ch, ).
July 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 121 MOTION to Expedite Consideration of Motion to Compel by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Justin)
July 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 128 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Charles K Verhoeven for Google, Inc. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-1-4837. (ch, )
July 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 127 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney David A Perlson for Google, Inc.. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-1-4837(ch, )
July 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 126 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Amy H Candido for Google, Inc.. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-1-4837(ch, )
July 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 120 MOTION for Protective Order to Preclude Depositions by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit in Support, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit N, # 16 Exhibit O, # 17 Exhibit P, # 18 Exhibit Q, # 19 Exhibit R, # 20 Text of Proposed Order)(Anderson, Carl)
July 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER granting 118 Motion for Extension of Time to File Technical Tutorials on DVD. Parties shall submit their tutorials on DVD to thecourt by August 4, 2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/24/09. (ehs, )
July 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 118 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Techincal Tutorials on DVD by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Anderson, Carl)
July 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER granting 116 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Nancy Claire Abernathy terminated as counsel for Function Media LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/13/09. (ch, )
July 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 116 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney N. Claire Abernathy by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
June 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 115 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alexandra G White on behalf of Function Media, L.L.C. (White, Alexandra)
June 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 114 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Stan Karas for Google, Inc.. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-1-4769(ch, )
June 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 113 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Diane Doolittle for Google, Inc. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-1-4769. (ch, )
June 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 112 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Carl G Anderson for Google, Inc. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-1-4769. (ch, )
June 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER granting 109 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. The page limitation applicable to Function Medias Markman Reply Brief is extended fromtwenty pages to twenty-three pages (excluding exhibits). Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/15/09. (ehs, )
June 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 110 REPLY to 98 Claim Construction Brief, filed by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Tribble, Max)
June 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 109 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tribble, Max)
June 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER granting 107 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. ORDERED that the page limitation applicable to Function Medias Markman Reply Brief is extended from ten pages to twenty pages (excluding exhibits). Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/5/09. (ch, )
May 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER granting 102 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Yahoo!, Inc., Function Media, L.L.C.. All claims and counterclaims are dismissed with prejudice. Parties shall bear their own attorneys' fees, expenses and costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 5/20/09. (ehs, )
May 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 105 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Collin Michael Maloney on behalf of Function Media, L.L.C. (Maloney, Collin)
May 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 104 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Otis W Carroll, Jr on behalf of Function Media, L.L.C. (Carroll, Otis)
May 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 103 EXHIBIT P to docket #[98-4] in CD-ROM format as to the Declaraton of Jason W Wolff in Support of Google Inc's Markman Brief (placed with documents that are too large to scan)(ehs, )
May 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 102 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Function Media, L.L.C., Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tribble, Max)
May 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 101 Additional Attachments to Main Document: 98 Claim Construction Brief,.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit J1 - 025 Pros. Hist, # 2 Exhibit J2 - 55543856 to Rosser, # 3 Exhibit K - Claim 47 Substitutions, # 4 Exhibit L1 - Aaddzz Brochure, # 5 Exhibit Aaddzz website, # 6 Exhibit M - AdForceUserGuide, # 7 Exhibit N - 6985882 to Del Sesto, # 8 Exhibit O - 6026368 to Brown)(Brooks, Juanita)
May 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 100 Additional Attachments to Main Document: 98 Claim Construction Brief,.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit H1 - 059 Pros. Hist, # 2 Exhibit H2 - 6167382 to Sparks, # 3 Exhibit H3 - 6119101 to Peckover, # 4 Exhibit I1 - 045 Pros. Hist., # 5 Exhibit I2 - 6038545 to Mandeberg)(Brooks, Juanita)
May 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 99 Additional Attachments to Main Document: 98 Claim Construction Brief,.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit E - Stone Tr., # 2 Exhibit F - Jenevein Decl., # 3 Exhibit G1 - 587 Pros. Hist. Part 1, # 4 Exhibit G1 - 587 Pros. Hist Part 2, # 5 Exhibit G2 - 6401075 to Mason, # 6 Exhibit G3 - 6430603 to Hunter)(Brooks, Juanita)
May 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 98 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Google, Inc., Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Index, # 2 Exhibit 1 - Summary of Claim Construction Disputes, # 3 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Wolff ISO Markman Brief, # 4 Exhibit A - 045 Re-exam Response, # 5 Exhibit B - 025 Re-exam Response, # 6 Exhibit C - 059 Re-exam Response, # 7 Exhibit D - Dean Tr.)(Brooks, Juanita)
May 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER granting 96 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. ORDERED that the page limitation applicable to Googles responsive claim construction brief shall be extended from thirty pages to forty-five pages (excluding attachments). Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 5/15/09. (ch, )
May 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 96 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages For Its Responsive Claim Construction Brief by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 order Granting Google's Unopposed Motion For Extension Of The Page Limits)(Wolff, Jason)
May 12, 2009 Opinion or Order ***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 94, 95, Unopposed Motion for leave to File Excess Pages. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ATTY WILL REFILE)(ch, )
May 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ***FILED IN ERROR. ORDERS ARE NOT FILED SEPARATELY. PLEASE IGNORE***Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages For Its Responsive Claim Construction Brief, Order Granting by Google, Inc.. (Wolff, Jason) Modified on 5/12/2009 (ch, ).
May 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ***FILED IN ERROR. NOT PDF SEARCHABLE AND NO ORDER. PLEASE IGNORE***Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages For Its Responsive Claim Construction Brief by Google, Inc.. (Wolff, Jason) Modified on 5/12/2009 (ch, ).
May 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 93 NOTICE by Function Media, L.L.C., Yahoo!, Inc. Withdrawing Dkt Nos. 79 & 83 (Tribble, Max)
May 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 92 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Justin Adatto Nelson on behalf of Function Media, L.L.C. (Nelson, Justin)
April 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 91 RESPONSE in Opposition re 83 MOTION to Compel DISCOVERY INTO NON-ACCUSED TECHNOLOGY filed by Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of M. Lane ISO Opposition to MTC, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17, # 19 Exhibit 18)(Lane, Michael)
April 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER granting 89 Motion for modification to the case schedule. Date for deft's P. R. 4-5(b) responsive claim construction briefs be extended from April 30, 2009, to May 15, 2009, and that the date for Function Medias P. R. 4-5(c) reply claim construction brief be extended from May 13, 2009, to June 11, 2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 4/29/09. (ehs, )
April 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 89 Joint MOTION for Modification to Case Schedule re 45 Order,,, Set Deadlines/Hearings,, by Function Media, L.L.C., Google, Inc., Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wolff, Jason)
April 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER granting Google Inc and Yahoo! Inc's 66 Motion for Leave to File supplement to PR 3-3 and 3-4 disclosures. That Google Inc. and Yahoo!, Inc.'s Second Supplemental Invalidity Contentions and accompanying document production served on Plaintiff by October 29, 2008 are deemed by the Court to be a part of Defendants Invalidity Contentions in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 4/27/09. (ehs, )
April 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 87 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daymon Jeffrey Rambin on behalf of Function Media, L.L.C. (Rambin, Daymon)
April 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 86 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nancy Claire Abernathy on behalf of Function Media, L.L.C. (Abernathy, Nancy)
April 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 85 REPLY to Response to Motion re 79 MOTION for Protective Order Barring Discovery of Non-Accused Products filed by Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jeffrey G. Homrig ISO Reply, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 ISO Reply to Opp)(Homrig, Jeffrey)
April 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 84 RESPONSE in Opposition re 79 MOTION for Protective Order Barring Discovery of Non-Accused Products filed by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tribble, Max)
April 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 83 MOTION to Compel by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Text of Proposed Order)(Tribble, Max)
April 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 82 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit B (continued), # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit C (continued), # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit E (continued), # 9 Exhibit F, # 10 Exhibit G, # 11 Exhibit G (continued), # 12 Exhibit H, # 13 Exhibit I, # 14 Exhibit J, # 15 Exhibit K, # 16 Exhibit L, # 17 Exhibit M, # 18 Exhibit N)(Tribble, Max)
April 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER granting 80 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. The page limitation applicable to Function Medias opening claim-construction brief isextended from thirty pages to forty-five pages (excluding exhibits). Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 4/9/09. (ehs, )
April 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 80 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tribble, Max)
April 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 79 MOTION for Protective Order Barring Discovery of Non-Accused Products by Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Decl. of Jeffrey G. Homrig ISO Yahoo!'s Motion, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Homrig Decl., # 3 Exhibit 2 to Homrig Decl., # 4 Exhibit 3 to Homrig Decl., # 5 Exhibit 4 to Homrig Decl., # 6 Exhibit 5 to Homrig Decl., # 7 Exhibit 6 to Homrig Decl., # 8 Exhibit 7 to Homrig Decl., # 9 Exhibit 8 to Homrig Decl., # 10 Exhibit 9 to Homrig Decl., # 11 Exhibit 10 to Homrig Decl., # 12 Text of Proposed Order Granting Yahoo!'s Motion for a Protective Order)(Lumish, Douglas)
February 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER granting 77 Motion for Extension of Time to File Expert declarations regarding Claim Construction issues. Deadline extended to 2/27/09. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 2/24/09. (ehs, )
February 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 77 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File expert declarations regarding Claim Construction Issues. by Google, Inc., Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Homrig, Jeffrey)
February 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER granting 75 Motion for Extension of Time to File expert declarations regarding Claim Construction Issues. Deadline extended to 2/24/09. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 2/20/09. (ehs, )
February 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 75 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tribble, Max)
February 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER granting 72 Motion for partial dismissal of deft Google Inc for infringement of US Patent No 6,829,587 without prejudice. Each party shall bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. FURTHER ORDERED that none of the foregoing shall affect any rights, causes of actions, counterclaims, defenses, or allegations pertaining to the other three patents-in-suit in the above-captioned litigation (U.S. Patents No. 6,446,045; U.S. Patent No. 7,240,025; and U.S. Patent No. 7,249,059. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 2/2/09. (ehs, )
January 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 73 NOTICE by Function Media, L.L.C. Joint P.R. 4-3 Statement (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Tribble, Max)
January 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 72 Agreed MOTION Partial Dismissal (agreed) by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tribble, Max)
December 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 71 NOTICE by Function Media, L.L.C., Google, Inc., Yahoo!, Inc. Regarding Potential Privilege Disputes (Wolff, Jason)
November 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 70 REPLY to Response to Motion re 66 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Further Supplement to Their P.R. 3-3 and 3-4 Disclosures filed by Google, Inc., Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit E)(Wolff, Jason)
November 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER granting 68 Motion for Extension of Time to File Privilege Logs. Deadline extended to 11/17/08. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 11/18/08. (ehs, )
November 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 68 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File To Further Extend Privilege Log Deadline by Function Media, L.L.C., Google, Inc., Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wolff, Jason) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/18/2008: # 2 Revised Proposed Order) (mpv, ).
November 13, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 67 RESPONSE in Opposition re 66 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Further Supplement to Their P.R. 3-3 and 3-4 Disclosures filed by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Tribble, Max)
October 31, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 66 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Further Supplement to Their P.R. 3-3 and 3-4 Disclosures by Google, Inc., Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Walsh, Thomas)
September 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER granting 64 Motion for Extension of Privilege Log Deadline. Deadline is extended to 11/17/08. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 9/30/08. (ch, )
September 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 64 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File to Extend Privilege Log Deadline by Google, Inc., Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Powers, Matthew)
September 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER granting 62 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney David J Healey terminated as counsel for Dft Yahoo!. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 9/25/08. (ch, )
September 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 62 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney David J. Healey by Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lumish, Douglas)
September 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 61 NOTICE of Designation of Attorney in Charge to Douglas E Lumish on behalf of Yahoo!, Inc. (Lumish, Douglas)
September 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER denying 20 Motion to Dismiss for reasons stated herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 9/18/08. (ch, )
June 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER granting 58 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Deadline is extended to 7/30/08. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/30/08. (ch, )
June 27, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 58 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Privilege Log Deadlines and Document Production Deadlines by Google, Inc., Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walsh, Thomas)
June 13, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER granting 56 Dft's Unopposed Motion for Leave to Supplement P.R. 3-3 and 3-4 Disclosures. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/13/08. (ch, )
June 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 56 MOTION for Leave to File Supplement to P.R. 3-3 and 3-4 Disclosures by Google, Inc., Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walsh, Thomas)
May 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 55 NOTICE by Google, Inc. Notice of Compliance (Walsh, Thomas)
April 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 54 NOTICE by Yahoo!, Inc. NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE (Lumish, Douglas)
April 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 53 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Harry Lee Gillam, Jr on behalf of Google, Inc. (Gillam, Harry)
April 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 52 NOTICE by Function Media, L.L.C. Notice of Change of Firm Name and Electronic Addresses (DeRieux, Elizabeth)
March 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 51 Agreed PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Charles Everingham on 3/20/08. (ehs, )
March 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 50 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walsh, Thomas)
March 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting 48 Motion for Extension of Time to File Protective order. Deadline is extended to 3/14/08. Signed by Judge Charles Everingham on 3/7/08. (ch, )
March 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 48 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Protective Order by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walsh, Thomas)
February 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting 46 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Deadline to submit a Protective Order 3/5/08. Signed by Judge Charles Everingham on 2/26/08. (ch, )
February 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 46 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File JOINT MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO SUBMIT PROTECTIVE ORDER by all parties by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Walsh, Thomas)
January 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 45 DOCKET CONTROL ORDER - Amended Pleadings due by 4/20/2009.,Discovery due by 9/18/2009.,Joinder of Parties due by 9/30/2008., Claims Construction Hearing set for 8/12/2009 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham.,Motions due by 10/2/2009.,Proposed Pretrial Order due by 10/22/2009., Jury Selection set for 11/2/2009 09:00AM before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham., Pretrial Conference set for 10/27/2009 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham. Mediation deadline is 10/2/09. All other deadlines are set forth herein. Signed by Judge Charles Everingham on 1/24/08. (ch, )
January 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 44 DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Judge Charles Everingham on 1/24/08. (ehs, )
January 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 43 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joseph Samuel Grinstein on behalf of Function Media, L.L.C. (Grinstein, Joseph)
January 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 42 Joint MOTION Entry of Docket Control and Discovery Orders by Function Media, L.L.C., Google, Inc., Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Docket Control Order# 2 Exhibit B - Discovery Order)(Bunt, Robert)
January 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER - The parties shall submit their proposed docket control and discovery orders to the court on January 22, 2008. The court deems February 5, 2008 to be the date of the initial case management conference. The Disclosure of Asserted Claims and Infringement Contentions is due on February 19,2008.. Signed by Judge Charles Everingham on 1/9/08. (ehs, )
January 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER assigning case to Judge Everintham by consent of the parties for all further proceedings and entry of judgment. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 1/9/08. (ehs, )
January 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge T. John Ward and Judge Chad Everingham: Status Conference held on 1/8/2008. Parties consented to Judge Chad Everingham. Claim construction hearing date and trial date were given to parties. Parties are to meet and confer regarding a scheduling order and discovery order. (Court Reporter Susan Simmons.) (shd, )
January 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 40 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge T. John Ward and Judge Charles Everingham: Status Conference held on 1/8/08. Counsel for the parties appeared and were asked if they consented to Judge Everingham. Depending on their answer, they were then given Markman and jury selection dates for the appropriate court. The parties are to meet and confer regarding a scheduling order and discovery order, and the parties have 14 days to submit the proposed orders. The Court further instructed the parties that the time for complying with P.R. 3-1 would be 10 days after the date of the parties filing their proposed orders. Court Adjourned. (Court Reporter Susan Simmons) (jml)
January 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 38 CONSENT to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham. (ehs, )
December 11, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER setting case for a status conference. Status Conference set for 1/8/2008 10:45 AM before Judge T. John Ward and Magistrate Judge Everingham. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 12/11/07. (ehs, )
October 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 36 REPLY to Response to Motion re 20 MOTION to Dismiss / Yahoo!, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss and Strike Function Media's Willfulness Claims, Or in the Alternative for a More Definite Statement filed by Yahoo!, Inc., Yahoo!, Inc.. (Homrig, Jeffrey)
October 15, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Plaintiff's ANSWER to Counterclaim of Yahoo! Inc. by Function Media, L.L.C..(Capshaw, Sidney)
October 15, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Plaintiff's ANSWER to Counterclaim of Google, Inc. by Function Media, L.L.C..(Capshaw, Sidney) Modified on 8/12/2008 (mpv, ). Modified on 8/12/2008 (mpv, ).
October 11, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting 31 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Andrew Wesley Spangler terminated . Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 10/11/07. (ehs, )
October 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 32 RESPONSE in Opposition re 20 MOTION to Dismiss / Yahoo!, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss and Strike Function Media's Willfulness Claims, Or in the Alternative for a More Definite Statement filed by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Capshaw, Sidney)
October 9, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Function Media, L.L.C.'s Unopposed Motion for Withdrawal of Andrew W. Spangler as Counsel by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Capshaw, Sidney)
October 4, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 30 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Juanita R Brooks on behalf of Google, Inc., Google, Inc. (Brooks, Juanita)
October 4, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 29 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jason W Wolff on behalf of Google, Inc. (Wolff, Jason)
October 2, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 26 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Jeffrey G. Homrig for Yahoo!, Inc. (FEE PAID) 2-1-3059 (ehs, )
October 2, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 25 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Matthew Douglas Powers for Yahoo!, Inc. (FEE PAID) 2-1-3059 (ehs, )
October 2, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 24 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Michael Lane for Yahoo!, Inc. (FEE PAID) 2-1-3059 (ehs, )
October 2, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 23 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Douglas E Lumish for Yahoo!, Inc. (FEE PAID) 2-1-3059 (ehs, )
October 1, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 28 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Jason W Wolff for Google, Inc. (FEE PAID) 2-1-3061 (ehs, )
October 1, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 27 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Juanita R Brooks for Google, Inc.. (FEE PAID) 2-1-3061(ehs, )
September 24, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 22 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Yahoo!, Inc. identifying Capital Research and Management Company as Corporate Parent and the beneficial owner of 10 percent or more of the shares of Yahoo!'s Common Stock.(Healey, David) Modified on 9/25/2007 (mpv, ).
September 24, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Defendant Yahoo!, Inc.'s ANSWER to Amended Complaint Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM /Counterclaims against Function Media, L.L.C. by Yahoo!, Inc..(Healey, David)
September 24, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss / Yahoo!, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss and Strike Function Media's Willfulness Claims, Or in the Alternative for a More Definite Statement by Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Healey, David)
September 24, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 19 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Google, Inc. identifying None as Corporate Parent. (Walsh, Thomas) Modified on 9/25/2007 (mpv, ).
September 24, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ANSWER to Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Function Media, L.L.C. by Google, Inc..(Walsh, Thomas)
August 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 17 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Function Media, L.L.C.. Yahoo!, Inc. served on 7/30/2007, answer due 8/20/2007. (ehs, )
August 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 16 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Function Media, L.L.C.. Google, Inc. served on 7/30/2007, answer due 8/20/2007. (ehs, )
July 30, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION Extending Time for Defendants Google, Inc. and Yahoo!, Inc. to Respond by Function Media, L.L.C.. (DeRieux, Elizabeth)
July 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Answer Due Deadline Updated for Google, Inc. to 9/24/2007; Yahoo!, Inc. to 9/24/2007. (ch, )
July 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting 11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Google and Yahoo deadline is extended to 9/24/07 . Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 7/26/07. (ch, )
July 25, 2007 Opinion or Order E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Google, Inc., Yahoo!, Inc.. (ch, )
July 24, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Form mailed to Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks. (ehs, )
July 24, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT (First Amended Complaint for Patent Infringement) against Google, Inc., Yahoo!, Inc., filed by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B1# 3 Exhibit B2# 4 Exhibit C# 5 Exhibit D1# 6 Exhibit D2# 7 Exhibit D3# 8 Exhibit D4)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
July 23, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time for Defendants Google, Inc. and Yahoo!, Inc. to Answer or Otherwise Respond) by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
July 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrew Wesley Spangler on behalf of Function Media, L.L.C. (Spangler, Andrew)
July 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sidney Calvin Capshaw, III on behalf of Function Media, L.L.C. (Capshaw, Sidney)
July 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Elizabeth L DeRieux on behalf of Function Media, L.L.C. (DeRieux, Elizabeth)
July 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Charles Ainsworth on behalf of Function Media, L.L.C. (Ainsworth, Charles)
July 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert Christopher Bunt on behalf of Function Media, L.L.C. (Bunt, Robert)
July 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Franklin Jones, Jr on behalf of Function Media, L.L.C. (Jones, Franklin)
July 11, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 7 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Function Media, L.L.C.. Google, Inc. served by Process Server on 7/5/2007, answer due 7/25/2007. (ch, )
July 11, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 6 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Function Media, L.L.C.. Yahoo!, Inc. served by Process Server on 7/5/2007, answer due 7/25/2007. (ch, )
July 3, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing fee: $ 350.00, receipt number 2-1-2726 (ch, )
July 3, 2007 Opinion or Order E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Google, Inc., Yahoo!, Inc.. (ehs, )
July 3, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Form mailed to Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks. (ehs, )
July 3, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Google, Inc., Yahoo!, Inc. (Filing fee $ 350.) , filed by Function Media, L.L.C. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A pt 1# 2 Exhibit A pt 2# 3 Exhibit A pt 3# 4 Exhibit A pt 4# 5 Exhibit B pt 1# 6 Exhibit B pt 2# 7 Exhibit B pt 3# 8 Exhibit B pt 4# 9 Exhibit C pt 1# 10 Exhibit C pt 2# 11 Exhibit C pt 3# 12 Exhibit C pt 4# 13 Civil Cover Sheet)(ehs, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Function Media, L.L.C. v. Google, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Function Media, L.L.C.
Represented By: Max Lalon Tribble, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google, Inc.
Represented By: Jason W Wolff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yahoo!, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Douglas Powers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Google, Inc.
Represented By: Jason W Wolff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Yahoo!, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Douglas Powers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Function Media, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?