January 18, 2011 |
Filing 490
Redaction of 437 Transcript. (ehs, )
|
January 18, 2011 |
Filing 489
Redaction of 436 Transcript. (ehs, )
|
January 18, 2011 |
Filing 488
Redaction of 433 Transcript. (ehs, )
|
January 18, 2011 |
Filing 487
Redaction of 432 Transcript. (ehs, )
|
January 18, 2011 |
Filing 486
Redaction of 431 Transcript. (ehs, )
|
January 18, 2011 |
Filing 485
Redaction of 430 Transcript. (ehs, )
|
October 25, 2010 |
Filing 484
ORDER granting in part 477 Motion to Redact. ORDERED that the court reporter redact the following passages from all publicly available versions of the trial transcripts. re 433 Transcript,,, 431 Transcript,,, 432 Transcript,,, 430 Transcript,,, 436 Transcript,,, 429 Transcript,,, The request to seal the preceding portions of the trial transcripts is DENIED as moot, as the court reporter has been instructed to redacte those passages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 10/25/2010. (ch, )
|
October 21, 2010 |
Filing 483
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of MOTIONS HEARING held on 8/19/10 before Judge Chad Everingham. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Hlmes, CSR,Telephone number: (903) 663-5082. (181 Pages)NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/15/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/26/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/24/2011. (tja, )
|
September 3, 2010 |
Filing 482
ORDER granting 363 Motion to Expedite; finding as moot 365 Motion to Expedite; granting 190 Motion ; granting 265 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply ; finding as moot 332 Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 9/3/10. (ehs, )
|
August 19, 2010 |
Filing 481
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham: Motion Hearing held on 8/19/2010 re Post trial motions(Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign-in Sheet) (jml)
|
July 16, 2010 |
Filing 480
NOTICE of Hearing: Hearing on all pending post-trial motions RESET for 8/19/2010, 09:00 AM, in Mag Ctrm (Marshall) before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham.(delat)
|
July 9, 2010 |
Filing 479
NOTICE of Hearing: Hearing on all pending post-trial motions set for 7/21/2010, 01:00 PM, in Mag Ctrm (Marshall) before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham.(delat, )
|
May 5, 2010 |
Filing 478
SEALED SURREPLY in Opposition to Motion re 457 SEALED MOTION for New Trial filed by Google, Inc.. (DeFranco, Edward)
|
April 28, 2010 |
Filing 477
Unopposed MOTION to Redact 433 Transcript,,, 431 Transcript,,, 432 Transcript,,, 430 Transcript,,, 436 Transcript,,, 429 Transcript,,, (Googles Unopposed Amended Motion to Seal and Redact Portions of Trial Transcripts) by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Candido, Amy)
|
April 28, 2010 |
Filing 476
ORDER granting 475 Motion for Extension of Time to File Sur-Reply to Function media's Motion for a New Trial on 5/5/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 4/28/2010. (ch, )
|
April 27, 2010 |
Filing 475
Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Sur-Reply Briefing as to 457 SEALED MOTION for New Trial by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeFranco, Edward)
|
April 22, 2010 |
Filing 474
SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 457 SEALED MOTION for New Trial filed by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Tribble, Max)
|
April 21, 2010 |
Filing 473
ORDER granting 472 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Google Inc shall be permitted to file five additional pages, for a total of ten pages, in its Surreply. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 4/21/2010. (ch, )
|
April 13, 2010 |
Filing 471
ORDER granting 470 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jessica Lea Hannah terminated as counsel for Function Media. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 4/13/10. (ehs, )
|
April 12, 2010 |
Filing 470
Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Jessica L. Hannah by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
|
April 12, 2010 |
Filing 469
ORDER - The court, sua sponte, VACATES its earlier order and DENIES Googles motion. Googles confidentiality concerns are adequately addressed by sealing the portions of the transcript that contain sensitive information. Accordingly, Google may file a motion to seal that identifies unsealed portions of the transcript that contain confidential information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 4/12/10. (ehs, )
|
April 9, 2010 |
Filing 468
ORDER granting 466 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 4/9/10. (ehs, )
|
April 8, 2010 |
Filing 467
SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 457 SEALED MOTION for New Trial filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A1, # 2 Exhibit A2, # 3 Exhibit A3, # 4 Exhibit A4, # 5 Exhibit A5, # 6 Exhibit A6, # 7 Exhibit A7, # 8 Exhibit B, # 9 Exhibit C, # 10 Text of Proposed Order)(DeFranco, Edward)
|
April 8, 2010 |
Filing 466
Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Its Opposition to Function Media's Motion for a New Trial by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeFranco, Edward)
|
March 29, 2010 |
Filing 465
ORDER granting 464 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 457 SEALED MOTION for New Trial Google shall file its Opposition to Function Medias Motion For a New Trial on or before 4/8/2010Function Media shall file its Reply in Support of Its Motion For a New Trial on or before 4/22/2010 Google shall file its Sur-Reply in Opposition to Function Medias Motion For a New Trial on or before 4/30/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 3/29/2010. (ch, )
|
March 26, 2010 |
Filing 464
Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 457 SEALED MOTION for New Trial --- Agreed Upon Modified Briefing Schedule by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeFranco, Edward)
|
March 18, 2010 |
Filing 463
SEALED SURREPLY to Motion re 409 SEALED MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Validity filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(DeFranco, Edward)
|
March 9, 2010 |
Filing 462
ORDER granting 461 Motion for Extension of Time to File Sur-Reply to Function Medias Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Validity. Responses due by 3/18/2010. Deadline for its Opposition to Function Media's Motion for a New Trial extended to April 1, 2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 3/9/10. (ehs, )
|
March 5, 2010 |
Filing 461
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (1) GOOGLES SUR-REPLY TO FUNCTION MEDIAS MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW ON VALIDITY AND FOR (2) GOOGLE'S OPPOSITION TO FUNCTION MEDIA'S MOTION FOR A NEW TRIAL by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeFranco, Edward)
|
March 4, 2010 |
Filing 460
ORDER granting 456 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages Limit on its Motion for New Trial. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 3/4/10. (ehs, )
|
March 4, 2010 |
Filing 459
ORDER granting 454 Motion for Leave to File Excess Page Limit on its Reply in Support of its Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Validity. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 3/4/10. (ehs, )
|
March 4, 2010 |
***FILED IN ERROR. ORDERS ARE NOT FILED AS A SEPARATE DOCUMENT Document # 458,. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (CLERK HAS ATTACHED ORDER TO DOCUMENT # 457)(ch, )
|
March 3, 2010 |
Filing 458
***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE.***Additional Attachments to Main Document: 457 SEALED MOTION for New Trial.. (Tribble, Max) Modified on 3/4/2010 (ch, ).
|
March 3, 2010 |
Filing 457
SEALED MOTION for New Trial by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2A, # 3 Exhibit 2B, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17, # 19 Exhibit 18, # 20 Exhibit 19, # 21 Exhibit 20, # 22 Exhibit 21, # 23 Exhibit 22, # 24 Exhibit 23, # 25 Exhibit 24, # 26 Exhibit 25, # 27 Exhibit 26, # 28 Exhibit 27)(Tribble, Max) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/4/2010: # 29 Text of Proposed Order) (ch, ).
|
March 3, 2010 |
Filing 456
Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in its Motion for New Trial by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tribble, Max)
|
March 3, 2010 |
Filing 455
SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 409 SEALED MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Validity filed by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Appendix)(Tribble, Max)
|
March 3, 2010 |
Filing 454
Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in its Reply in Support of its Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Validity by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Grinstein, Joseph)
|
March 1, 2010 |
Filing 453
***VACATED PER ORDER # 469 ***ORDER granting 452 Motion to Redact re 428 Transcript, 433 Transcript, 431 Transcript, 432 Transcript, 430 Transcript, 436 Transcript, 437 Transcript, 429 Transcript, 434 Transcript, 427 Transcript, 435 Transcript.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 3/1/10. (ehs, ) Modified on 4/12/2010 (ehs, ).
|
February 26, 2010 |
Filing 452
Unopposed MOTION to Redact 433 Transcript,,, 431 Transcript,,, 432 Transcript,,, 430 Transcript,,, 436 Transcript,,, 437 Transcript,,, 429 Transcript,,, by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Candido, Amy)
|
February 26, 2010 |
Filing 451
ORDER denying 120 Motion for Protective Order; denying 150 Motion to Expedite. The motion for protective order was orally DENIED. The motion to expedite is DENIED as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 2/26/2010. (ch, )
|
February 22, 2010 |
Filing 450
NOTICE of Intent to Request Redaction by Amy H Candido re 428 Transcript,,, 433 Transcript,,, 431 Transcript,,, 432 Transcript,,, 430 Transcript,,, 436 Transcript,,, 437 Transcript,,, 429 Transcript,,, 434 Transcript,,, 427 Transcript,,, 435 Transcript,,,. (Candido, Amy)
|
February 22, 2010 |
Filing 449
ORDER granting 446 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Function Media's Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Validity. Responses due by 3/3/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 2/22/10. (ehs, )
|
February 19, 2010 |
Filing 448
REPLY to Response to Motion re 406 SEALED MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Regarding Damages filed by Google, Inc.. (DeFranco, Edward)
|
February 19, 2010 |
Filing 447
REPLY to Response to Motion re 412 SEALED MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Regarding Invalidity filed by Google, Inc.. (DeFranco, Edward)
|
February 18, 2010 |
Filing 446
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 445 Sealed Response to Motion, by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Grinstein, Joseph)
|
February 16, 2010 |
Filing 445
SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 409 SEALED MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Validity filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2 part 1, # 4 Exhibit 2 part 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6, # 9 Exhibit 7, # 10 Exhibit 8, # 11 Exhibit 9, # 12 Errata 10, # 13 Exhibit 11, # 14 Exhibit 12, # 15 Exhibit 13, # 16 Exhibit 14, # 17 Exhibit 15)(DeFranco, Edward)
|
February 12, 2010 |
Filing 444
ORDER granting 443 Motion for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Function Medias Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Validity. Responses due by 2/16/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 2/12/10. (ehs, )
|
February 11, 2010 |
Filing 443
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 409 SEALED MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Validity by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Candido, Amy)
|
February 9, 2010 |
Filing 442
NOTICE of Intent to Request Redaction by Amy H Candido re 428 Transcript,,, 433 Transcript,,, 431 Transcript,,, 432 Transcript,,, 430 Transcript,,, 436 Transcript,,, 437 Transcript,,, 429 Transcript,,, 434 Transcript,,, 427 Transcript,,, 435 Transcript,,,. (Candido, Amy)
|
February 9, 2010 |
Filing 441
RESPONSE to Motion re 412 SEALED MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Regarding Invalidity filed by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tribble, Max)
|
February 9, 2010 |
Filing 440
RESPONSE to Motion re 406 SEALED MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Regarding Damages filed by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tribble, Max)
|
February 3, 2010 |
Filing 439
SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 408 Amended SEALED MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Non-Infringement filed by Google, Inc.. (DeFranco, Edward)
|
February 2, 2010 |
Filing 438
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 1/26/10 Afternoon - Verdict before Judge Chad Everingham. Court Reporter/Transcriber: S. Simmons/S. Holmes,Telephone number: 903/935-3868. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 2/26/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/8/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/6/2010. (lss, )
|
February 2, 2010 |
Filing 437
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 1/26/10 Morning Session of Trial before Judge Chad Everingham. Court Reporter/Transcriber: S. Simmons/S. Holmes,Telephone number: 903/935-3868. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 2/26/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/8/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/6/2010. (lss, )
|
February 2, 2010 |
Filing 436
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 1/25/10 Afternoon Session of Trial before Judge Chad Everingham. Court Reporter/Transcriber: S. Simmons/S. Holmes,Telephone number: 903/935-3868. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 2/26/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/8/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/6/2010. (lss, )
|
February 2, 2010 |
Filing 435
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 1/25/10 Morning Session of Trial before Judge Chad Everingham. Court Reporter/Transcriber: S. Simmons/S. Holmes,Telephone number: 903/935-3868. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 2/26/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/8/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/6/2010. (lss, )
|
February 2, 2010 |
Filing 434
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 1/22/10 Afternoon Session of Trial before Judge Chad Everingham. Court Reporter/Transcriber: S. Simmons/S. Holmes,Telephone number: 903/935-3868. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 2/26/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/8/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/6/2010. (lss, )
|
February 2, 2010 |
Filing 433
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 1/22/10 Morning Session of Trial before Judge Chad Everingham. Court Reporter/Transcriber: S. Simmons/S. Holmes,Telephone number: 903/935-3868. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 2/26/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/8/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/6/2010. (lss, )
|
February 2, 2010 |
Filing 432
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 1/21/10 Afternoon Session before Judge Chad Everingham. Court Reporter/Transcriber: S. Simmons/S. Holmes,Telephone number: 903/935-3868. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 2/26/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/8/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/6/2010. (lss, )
|
February 2, 2010 |
Filing 431
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 1/21/10 Morning Session before Judge Chad Everingham. Court Reporter/Transcriber: S. Simmons/S. Holmes,Telephone number: 903/935-3868. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 2/26/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/8/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/6/2010. (lss, )
|
February 2, 2010 |
Filing 430
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 1/20/10 Afternoon Session before Judge Chad Everingham. Court Reporter/Transcriber: S. Simmons/S. Holmes,Telephone number: 903/935-3868. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 2/26/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/8/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/6/2010. (lss, )
|
February 2, 2010 |
Filing 429
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 1/20/10 Morning Session of Trial before Judge Chad Everingham. Court Reporter/Transcriber: S. Simmons/S. Holmes,Telephone number: 903/935-3868. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 2/26/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/8/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/6/2010. (lss, )
|
February 2, 2010 |
Filing 428
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 1/19/10 Afternoon Session of Trial before Judge Chad Everingham. Court Reporter/Transcriber: S. Simmons/S. Holmes,Telephone number: 903/935-3868. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 2/26/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/8/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/6/2010. (lss, )
|
February 2, 2010 |
Filing 427
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 1/19/10 Morning Session of Trial before Judge Chad Everingham. Court Reporter/Transcriber: S. Simmons/S. Holmes,Telephone number: 903/935-3868. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 2/26/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/8/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/6/2010. (lss, )
|
February 2, 2010 |
Filing 426
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 1/4/10; Voir Dire Proceedings before Judge Chad Everingham. Court Reporter/Transcriber: S. Simmons/S. Holmes,Telephone number: 903/935-3868. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 2/26/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/8/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/6/2010. (lss, )
|
February 2, 2010 |
Filing 425
Sealed Transcript. All Sealed portions of trial transcript - Sealed Portions No. 1 through No. 16. (Susan Simmons, CSR)
|
January 27, 2010 |
Filing 415
Google's Final Exhibit List. (jml)
|
January 27, 2010 |
Filing 414
Function Media Final Trial Exhibit List. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit List Part 2, # 2 Exhibit List Part 3)(jml, )
|
January 26, 2010 |
Filing 424
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham: Jury Trial completed on 1/26/2010. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR.) (jml)
|
January 26, 2010 |
Filing 418
SEALED Jury Notes. (jml)
|
January 26, 2010 |
Filing 417
Google's proposed Jury Instruction refused by Judge Everingham on 1/26/10.(jml)
|
January 26, 2010 |
Filing 416
Function Media's Proposed Jury Instruction - Refused by Judge Everingham on 1/26/10.(jml)
|
January 26, 2010 |
Filing 413
JURY VERDICT. (jml)
|
January 26, 2010 |
Filing 412
SEALED MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Regarding Invalidity by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K-1, # 12 Exhibit K-2, # 13 Exhibit K-3, # 14 Exhibit K-4, # 15 Exhibit K-5, # 16 Exhibit K-6, # 17 Exhibit K-7, # 18 Exhibit K-8, # 19 Exhibit L, # 20 Exhibit M-1, # 21 Exhibit M-2, # 22 Exhibit M-3, # 23 Exhibit M-4, # 24 Exhibit M-5, # 25 Exhibit M-6, # 26 Exhibit M-7, # 27 Exhibit M-8, # 28 Exhibit M-9, # 29 Exhibit M-10, # 30 Exhibit M-11, # 31 Exhibit M-12, # 32 Exhibit M-13, # 33 Exhibit M-14, # 34 Exhibit N, # 35 Exhibit O, # 36 Exhibit P, # 37 Exhibit Q, # 38 Exhibit R, # 39 Exhibit S, # 40 Text of Proposed Order)(Candido, Amy)
|
January 26, 2010 |
Filing 411
SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 410 Sealed Response to Motion,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 2-2, # 2 Exhibit 2-3)(Tribble, Max)
|
January 26, 2010 |
Filing 410
SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 408 Amended SEALED MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Non-Infringement filed by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 3, # 3 Exhibit 4, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Tribble, Max)
|
January 26, 2010 |
Filing 409
SEALED MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Validity by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1pt2, # 2 Exhibit 1pt1, # 3 Exhibit 1pt3, # 4 Exhibit 1pt4, # 5 Exhibit 2, # 6 Exhibit 3, # 7 Exhibit 4, # 8 Exhibit 5, # 9 Text of Proposed Order)(Tribble, Max)
|
January 25, 2010 |
Filing 423
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham: Jury Trial held on 1/25/2010. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR.) (jml)
|
January 25, 2010 |
Filing 408
Amended SEALED MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Non-Infringement by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-1, # 2 Exhibit A-2, # 3 Exhibit B-1, # 4 Exhibit B-2, # 5 Exhibit B-3, # 6 Exhibit C, # 7 Exhibit D, # 8 Exhibit E)(Candido, Amy) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/27/2010: # 9 Text of Proposed Order) (ch, ).
|
January 25, 2010 |
Filing 407
SEALED MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Non-Infringement by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (part 1), # 2 Exhibit A (part 2), # 3 Exhibit B (part 1), # 4 Exhibit B (part 2), # 5 Exhibit B (part 3), # 6 Exhibit C, # 7 Exhibit D, # 8 Exhibit E)(Candido, Amy) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/25/2010: # 9 Text of Proposed Order) (ch, ).
|
January 25, 2010 |
Filing 406
SEALED MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Regarding Damages by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Candido, Amy) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/25/2010: # 8 Text of Proposed Order) (ch, ).
|
January 25, 2010 |
***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 400, 401, 402, Motions and Sealed Attachments. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (SEE CORRECTED DOCUMENT # 403)(ch, )
|
January 24, 2010 |
Filing 405
Emergency SEALED MOTION to Preclude Evidence and Argument Concerning Google's Patent Activities by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, part 1, # 8 Exhibit 7, part 2, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(DeFranco, Edward)
|
January 24, 2010 |
Filing 404
SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 403 SEALED MOTION to Enforce Opinion Regarding Google's Expert Michael Wagner filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Candido, Amy)
|
January 23, 2010 |
Filing 403
***REPLACES # 400, 401, AND 402 *** SEALED MOTION to Enforce Opinion Regarding Google's Expert Michael Wagner by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Tribble, Max) Modified on 1/25/2010 (ch, ).
|
January 23, 2010 |
Filing 402
***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY. PLEASE IGNORE.*** SEALED MOTION to Enforce Opinion Regarding Google's Expert Michael Wagner by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Tribble, Max) Modified on 1/25/2010 (ch, ).
|
January 23, 2010 |
Filing 401
***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY. PLEASE IGNORE.***SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 400 MOTION Motion to Enforce Opinion Regarding Google's Expert Michael Wagner. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 2)(Tribble, Max) Modified on 1/25/2010 (ch, ).
|
January 23, 2010 |
Filing 400
***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY. PLEASE IGNORE.*** MOTION Motion to Enforce Opinion Regarding Google's Expert Michael Wagner by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tribble, Max) Modified on 1/25/2010 (ch, ).
|
January 22, 2010 |
Filing 422
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham: Jury Trial held on 1/22/2010. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR.) (jml)
|
January 21, 2010 |
Filing 421
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham: Jury Trial held on 1/21/2010. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR.) (jml)
|
January 20, 2010 |
Filing 420
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham: Jury Trial held on 1/20/2010. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR.) (jml)
|
January 19, 2010 |
Filing 419
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham: Jury Trial held on 1/19/2010. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR.) (jml)
|
January 19, 2010 |
Filing 399
ORDER granting 389 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages in it Response to Emergency Motion of Google for Sanctions Based on Function Media's Failure to Disclose Michael Dean's Fraudulent Activities. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 1/19/2010. (ch, )
|
January 19, 2010 |
Filing 398
ORDER denying 391 Sealed Emergency Motion to Enforce Order and Prohibit Damages expert testimony. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 1/19/2010. (ch, )
|
January 19, 2010 |
Filing 397
ORDER denying 387 Sealed Emergency Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 1/19/2010. (ch, )
|
January 19, 2010 |
Filing 396
ORDER taking under advisement 364 Sealed Emergency Motion for Adverse Inference Instruction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 1/19/2010. (ch, )
|
January 19, 2010 |
Filing 395
SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 387 Emergency SEALED MOTION of Google for Sanctions Based on Function Media's Failure to Disclose Michael Dean's Fraudulent Activities filed by Google, Inc.. (Anderson, Carl)
|
January 19, 2010 |
Filing 394
SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 391 Emergency SEALED MOTION to Enforce Court Order filed by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Text of Proposed Order)(Tribble, Max)
|
January 18, 2010 |
Filing 393
Sealed Document - Google's Surreply to Function Media's Emergency Motion for Adverse Inference Instruction Regarding Google's Destruction of Evidence. (Attachments: # 1 Supplemental Beaumont Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 1)(Candido, Amy)
|
January 18, 2010 |
Filing 392
SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 391 Emergency SEALED MOTION to Enforce Court Order. (DeFranco, Edward)
|
January 18, 2010 |
Filing 391
Emergency SEALED MOTION to Enforce Court Order by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A part 1, # 3 Exhibit A part 2, # 4 Exhibit A (part 3), # 5 Exhibit A (part 4), # 6 Exhibit A (part 5(, # 7 Exhibit A (part6), # 8 Exhibit A (part 7), # 9 Exhibit A (part 8))(DeFranco, Edward)
|
January 17, 2010 |
Filing 390
SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 387 Emergency SEALED MOTION of Google for Sanctions Based on Function Media's Failure to Disclose Michael Dean's Fraudulent Activities filed by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Text of Proposed Order)(Tribble, Max)
|
January 17, 2010 |
Filing 389
Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages re Emergency Motion of Google Dkt. 387 by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tribble, Max)
|
January 17, 2010 |
Filing 388
SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 364 Emergency SEALED MOTION for Adverse Inference Instruction Regarding Google's Destruction of Evidence filed by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6)(Tribble, Max)
|
January 15, 2010 |
Filing 387
Emergency SEALED MOTION of Google for Sanctions Based on Function Media's Failure to Disclose Michael Dean's Fraudulent Activities by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Todd Kennedy, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, part 1, # 7 Exhibit 5, part 2, # 8 Exhibit 5, part 3, # 9 Exhibit 5, part 4, # 10 Exhibit 5, part 5, # 11 Exhibit 5, part 6, # 12 Exhibit 6, part 1, # 13 Exhibit 6, part 2, # 14 Exhibit 6, part 3, # 15 Exhibit 6, part 4, # 16 Exhibit 6, part 5, # 17 Exhibit 6, part 6, # 18 Exhibit 7, # 19 Exhibit 8, # 20 Exhibit 9, # 21 Exhibit 10, # 22 Text of Proposed Order)(DeFranco, Edward)
|
January 15, 2010 |
Filing 386
SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 364 Emergency SEALED MOTION for Adverse Inference Instruction Regarding Google's Alleged Destruction of Evidence filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Theresa H. Beaumont, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Candido, Amy)
|
January 15, 2010 |
Filing 385
ORDER - The court has reviewed the deposition designations and objections thereto. The court sustains Googles objections that are directed toward testimony concerning its own patent prosecution activities. The court overrules the balance of Googles objections to the plaintiffs deposition designations. The plaintiffs objections to Googles deposition designations are carried with the case. The court will address the admissibility of the acquisition documents on a case-by-case basis during the course of the trial. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 1/15/10. (ehs, )
|
January 15, 2010 |
Filing 384
ORDER denying Function Media, L.L.C.s (FM) motion in limine No. 17 (References or Expert Opinions Regarding Prior Art not Previously Selected or Prior Art not Timely Identified/Charted) (Dkt. No. 188). Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 1/15/10. (ehs, )
|
January 15, 2010 |
Filing 383
MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER granting in part and denying inpart Function Media, L.L.C.s (FM) motion to exclude certain expert opinions (Dkt. No. 331). Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 1/15/10. (ehs, )
|
January 15, 2010 |
Filing 382
MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER - granting in part and denying in part Google Inc.s (Google) motion to exclude certain expert opinions (Dkt. No. 329).. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 1/15/10. (ehs, )
|
January 15, 2010 |
Filing 381
MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER - Granting FMs motion for summary judgment of no inequitable conduct and the request for a declaration that this case is exceptional is CARRIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 1/15/10. (ehs, )
|
January 15, 2010 |
Filing 380
ORDER setting forth ruling on motions in limine. The court DENIES these two motions in limine #46 and 48. Motion in limine No. 47 granted. Defendant Google, Inc.s motion in limine No. 1 is granted.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 1/15/10. (ehs, )
|
January 14, 2010 |
Filing 379
Sealed Document - Supplemental Notice to Emergency Motion (Dkt. 364) for Adverse Inference Instrction Regarding Google's Destruction of Evidence. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Tribble, Max) Modified on 1/15/2010 (ch, ).
|
January 14, 2010 |
Filing 378
NOTICE by Function Media, L.L.C., Google, Inc. of Joint Submission of Objections to the Admission of Designated Deposition Tesimony (Anderson, Carl)
|
January 14, 2010 |
Filing 377
NOTICE by Function Media, L.L.C. Function Media's Identification of Documents Falling Outside Google's Objection to Acquisitions Related Documents (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Tribble, Max)
|
January 14, 2010 |
Filing 376
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of MOTIONS HEARING held on 1/12/10 before Judge Chad Everingham. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR,Telephone number: (903) 663-5082. (68 pages)NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/8/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/17/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/19/2010. (tja, )
|
January 12, 2010 |
Filing 375
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham: Motion Hearing held on 1/12/2010 re 190 MOTION to Seal Documents and Close the Courtroom During Presentation of Confidential Material at Trial filed by Google, Inc., 359 SEALED MOTION to Strike the Deposition Errata Sheet of Mireya Bravomalo filed by Function Media, L.L.C., 332 MOTION Consolidate Argument on Motions to Exclude Expert Opinions re 329 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Certain Opinions of Function Media's Damages Expert Walter Bratic, 331 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Certain Expert Opinions MOTION Consolidate Argument on Motions to Exclude Expert Opinions re 329 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Certain Opinions of Function Media's Damages Expert Walter Bratic, 331 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Certain Expert Opinions filed by Function Media, L.L.C., 360 SEALED MOTION for Clarification Concerning Defense Exhibit 213 filed by Function Media, L.L.C.(Court Reporter Shelly Holmes.)(Attachments: #(1) sign-in sheet)(delat)
|
January 12, 2010 |
Filing 374
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of PRE-TRIAL HEARING held on 1/5/10 before Judge Chad Everingham. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR,Telephone number: (903) 663-5082. (118 pages)NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/5/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/16/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/15/2010. (tja, )
|
January 12, 2010 |
Filing 373
***REPLACES # 372 ***REPLY to Response to Motion re 359 SEALED MOTION to Strike the Deposition Errata Sheet of Mireya Bravomalo filed by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Tribble, Max) Modified on 1/12/2010 (ch, ).
|
January 12, 2010 |
Filing 372
***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY SEE CORRECTED # 373. PLEASE IGNORE.***REPLY to Response to Motion re 359 SEALED MOTION to Strike the Deposition Errata Sheet of Mireya Bravomalo filed by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Tribble, Max) Modified on 1/12/2010 (ch, ).
|
January 12, 2010 |
***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY Document # 372, Reply. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (SEE CORRECTED DOCUMENT # 373)(ch, )
|
January 11, 2010 |
Filing 371
SEALED SUR-REPLY to Motion re 331 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Certain Expert Opinions filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 13)(Candido, Amy)
|
January 11, 2010 |
Filing 370
SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 360 SEALED MOTION for Clarification Concerning Defense Exhibit 213 filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Anderson, Carl)
|
January 11, 2010 |
Filing 369
SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 359 SEALED MOTION to Strike the Deposition Errata Sheet of Mireya Bravomalo filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Candido, Amy)
|
January 11, 2010 |
Filing 368
ORDER granting 362 Motion for Extension of Time of Time of Eighteen Minutes to File Googles Opposition to Function Medias Motion to Exclude Certain Expert Opinions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 1/11/10. (ehs, )
|
January 11, 2010 |
Filing 367
Sealed Document - Supplement to Sealed Motion to Strike the Deposition Errata Sheet of Mireya Bravomalo (Dkt. 359). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Tribble, Max) Modified on 1/11/2010 (ch, ).
|
January 11, 2010 |
Filing 366
NOTICE of Hearing: Hearing on Google's Motion to Seal Documents and Close the Courtroom (Dkt. #190); Funcction Media's Motion to Exclude Certain Expert Opinions (Dkt. #331); Function Media's Sealed Motion to Strike the Deposition Errata Sheet of Mireya Bravomalo (Dkt. #359); and Function Media's Sealed Motion for Clarification Concerning Defense Exhibit 213 (Dkt. #360), set for 1/12/2010, 01:30 PM, in Mag Ctrm (Marshall) before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham.(delat)
|
January 11, 2010 |
Filing 365
MOTION to Expedite Motion for Adverse Inference Instruction Regarding Google's Destruction of Documents by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tribble, Max)
|
January 11, 2010 |
Filing 364
Emergency SEALED MOTION for Adverse Inference Instruction Regarding Google's Destruction of Evidence by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Text of Proposed Order)(Tribble, Max)
|
January 8, 2010 |
Filing 363
Joint MOTION to Expedite Hearing by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tribble, Max)
|
January 8, 2010 |
Filing 362
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 356 Sealed Response to Motion, by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Candido, Amy)
|
January 8, 2010 |
Filing 361
SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 331 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Certain Expert Opinions filed by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Nos. 1-3)(Nelson, Justin)
|
January 8, 2010 |
Filing 360
SEALED MOTION for Clarification Concerning Defense Exhibit 213 by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Tribble, Max)
|
January 8, 2010 |
Filing 359
SEALED MOTION to Strike the Deposition Errata Sheet of Mireya Bravomalo by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Text of Proposed Order)(Tribble, Max)
|
January 8, 2010 |
Filing 358
SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 356 Sealed Response to Motion,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B to Declaration of Ben Lee, # 2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Mireya Bravomalo - Part 1, # 3 Exhibit A to Declaration of Mireya Bravomalo - Part 2, # 4 Exhibit A to Declaration of Mireya Bravomalo - Part 3, # 5 Exhibit A to Declaration of Mireya Bravomalo - Part 4, # 6 Exhibit A to Declaration of Mireya Bravomalo - Part 5, # 7 Exhibit B to Declaration of Mireya Bravomalo)(Candido, Amy)
|
January 8, 2010 |
Filing 357
RESPONSE to Motion re 332 MOTION Consolidate Argument on Motions to Exclude Expert Opinions re 329 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Certain Opinions of Function Media's Damages Expert Walter Bratic, 331 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Certain Expert Opinions MOTION Consolidate Argument on Motions to Exclude Expert Opinions re 329 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Certain Opinions of Function Media's Damages Expert Walter Bratic, 331 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Certain Expert Opinions filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Candido, Amy)
|
January 8, 2010 |
Filing 356
SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 331 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Certain Expert Opinions filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Bravomalo Declaration, # 13 Lee Declaration, # 14 Text of Proposed Order)(Candido, Amy)
|
January 7, 2010 |
Filing 355
ORDER - Regarding the jury trial in this case, scheduled to begin 1/19/2010 each side will have 15 hours to present its evidence. Such time is inclusive of direct examination of a partys witnesses and cross-examination of opposing witnesses, together with any deposition designations. Such time is exclusive of voir dire, opening statements, and final argument. Each side will have 40 minutes to make opening statements. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 1/7/2010. (ch, )
|
January 7, 2010 |
Filing 354
SEALED RESPONSE by Google, Inc. to 351 Function Media's Supplemental Notice on 329 Motion to Strike Acquisition Testimony (Other) filed by Google, Inc.. (Candido, Amy)
|
January 5, 2010 |
Filing 353
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham: Evidentiary Hearing held on 1/5/2010. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR.) (Attachments: # 1 Sign-in Sheet) (jml)
|
January 5, 2010 |
Filing 351
NOTICE by Function Media, L.L.C. re 344 Sealed Response to Motion, to Strike Acquisition Testimony (Nelson, Justin)
|
January 5, 2010 |
Filing 350
ORDER granting 347 Motion for entry of order regarding Adforce software files. The parties have resolved their dispute and have agreed that neither party will use this CD or the files it contains in any way at trial, and jointly move the Court for an Order excluding the use of these materials at trial. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 1/5/10. (ehs, )
|
January 4, 2010 |
Filing 352
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham: Jury Selection held on 1/4/2010. (Court Reporter Susan Simmons, CSR.) (jml)
|
January 4, 2010 |
Filing 349
SEALED RESPONSE to the Substantive Issues in Motion re 335 SEALED MOTION to Reconsider the Court's Denial of FM's Motion in Limine No. 47 filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Candido, Amy)
|
January 4, 2010 |
Filing 348
SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 333 SEALED MOTION to Preclude Admission of Untimely Evidence filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Text of Proposed Order)(Candido, Amy)
|
January 4, 2010 |
Filing 347
Joint MOTION FOR ENTRY OF ORDER REGARDING ADFORCE SOFTWARE FILES by Function Media, L.L.C., Google, Inc.. (Candido, Amy) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/5/2010: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (ch, ).
|
January 4, 2010 |
Filing 346
ORDER granting 335 Motion to Reconsider Motion in Limine 47 (Dkt. No. 335) for purposes of voir dire only. At the January 5, 2010 evidentiary hearing, the court shall hear argument on whether to grant or deny Motion in Limine 47 for the remainder of the trial. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 1/4/10. (ehs, )
|
January 4, 2010 |
Filing 345
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 188 Sealed Motion; granting in part and denying in part 193 Sealed Motion; granting in part and denying in part 194 Sealed Motion; granting in part and denying in part 196 Sealed Motion; granting in part and denying in part 197 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 198 Sealed Motion; granting in part and denying in part 199 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 200 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 202 Sealed Motion; granting in part and denying in part 204 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 205 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 206 Motion in Limine. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 1/4/10. (ehs, )
|
December 31, 2009 |
Filing 344
SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 329 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Certain Opinions of Function Media's Damages Expert Walter Bratic filed by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12)(Nelson, Justin)
|
December 30, 2009 |
Filing 343
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 334 Motion to Expedite. Argument on FMs motion will be heard at the exhibit hearing scheduled for January 5, 2010. The defendant Google, Inc. (Google) shall file a response to FMs motion to preclude prior to the evidentiary hearing.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 12/30/09. (ehs, )
|
December 29, 2009 |
Filing 342
ORDER granting 338 Motion for entry of order regarding conduct of expert depositions. Ruling set forth herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 12/29/09. (ehs, )
|
December 29, 2009 |
Filing 341
REPLY to Response to Motion re 334 MOTION to Expedite Consideration of Motion to Preclude Admission of Untimely Evidence filed by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Grinstein, Joseph)
|
December 29, 2009 |
Filing 340
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert M Parker on behalf of Function Media, L.L.C. (Parker, Robert)
|
December 28, 2009 |
Filing 339
RESPONSE in Opposition re 334 MOTION to Expedite Consideration of Motion to Preclude Admission of Untimely Evidence filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Candido, Amy)
|
December 28, 2009 |
Filing 338
Unopposed MOTION Entry of Order Regarding Conduct of Expert Depositions by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Grinstein, Joseph)
|
December 28, 2009 |
Filing 337
Additional Attachments to Main Document: 335 SEALED MOTION to Reconsider FM's Motion in Limine No. 47.. (Grinstein, Joseph)
|
December 28, 2009 |
Filing 336
Additional Attachments to Main Document: 333 SEALED MOTION to Preclude Admission of Untimely Evidence.. (Grinstein, Joseph)
|
December 23, 2009 |
Filing 335
SEALED MOTION to Reconsider FM's Motion in Limine No. 47 by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tribble, Max)
|
December 23, 2009 |
Filing 334
MOTION to Expedite Consideration of Motion to Preclude Admission of Untimely Evidence by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tribble, Max)
|
December 23, 2009 |
Filing 333
SEALED MOTION to Preclude Admission of Untimely Evidence by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Tribble, Max)
|
December 23, 2009 |
Filing 332
MOTION Consolidate Argument on Motions to Exclude Expert Opinions re 329 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Certain Opinions of Function Media's Damages Expert Walter Bratic, 331 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Certain Expert Opinions by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tribble, Max)
|
December 23, 2009 |
Filing 331
SEALED MOTION to Exclude Certain Expert Opinions by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L (part 1), # 13 Exhibit L (part 2), # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit N, # 16 Text of Proposed Order)(Tribble, Max)
|
December 22, 2009 |
Filing 330
ORDER granting 275 Motion to Compel Previously-Taken Deposition Testimony of Google Executives. Google to produce: (1) the deposition transcript plus any accompanying deposition exhibits of Eric Schmidt in the Viacom case; and (2) any other depositions in the Viacom case or otherwise that relate to the reasons why Google acquired a company in the advertising space. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 12/22/09. (ehs, )
|
December 18, 2009 |
***FILED IN ERROR. OVER PAGE LIMITS Document # 327, Sealed Motion to Exclude. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ATTY REFILED SEE DOCUMENT # 329)(ch, )
|
December 17, 2009 |
Filing 329
SEALED MOTION to Exclude Certain Opinions of Function Media's Damages Expert Walter Bratic by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5 part 1, # 6 Exhibit 5 part 2, # 7 Exhibit 5 part 3, # 8 Exhibit 5 part 4, # 9 Exhibit 5 part 5, # 10 Exhibit 6, # 11 Exhibit 7, # 12 Text of Proposed Order)(Candido, Amy)
|
December 16, 2009 |
Filing 328
SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 327 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Certain Opinions of Function Media's Damages Expert Walter Bratic. (Attachments: Exhibit 5 (pt 1 of 5), # 1 Exhibit 5 (pt 2 of 5), # 2 Exhibit 5 (pt 3 of 5), # 3 Exhibit 5 (pt 4 of 5), # 4 Exhibit 5 (pt 5 of 5), # 5 Exhibit 6, # 6 Exhibit 7, # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Candido, Amy)
|
December 16, 2009 |
Filing 327
***FILED IN ERROR. OVER THE PAGE LIMIT. PLEASE IGNORE. ATTY REFILED SEE # 329.*** SEALED MOTION to Exclude Certain Opinions of Function Media's Damages Expert Walter Bratic by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Candido, Amy) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/17/2009: # 5 Text of Proposed Order) (ch, ). Modified on 12/18/2009 (ch, ).
|
December 16, 2009 |
Filing 326
ORDER denying 321 Motion to Expedite briefing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 12/16/09. (ehs, )
|
December 16, 2009 |
Filing 325
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 207 Sealed Motion for summary judgment of noninfringement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 12/16/09. (ehs, )
|
December 16, 2009 |
Filing 324
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 201 Sealed Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 12/16/09. (ch, )
|
December 15, 2009 |
Filing 323
SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 275 SEALED MOTION to Compel Previously-Taken Deposition Testimony of Google Executives filed by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Grinstein, Joseph)
|
December 14, 2009 |
Filing 322
RESPONSE in Opposition re 321 MOTION to Expedite Briefing and Consideration of Google's Daubert Motion to Exclude Certain Testimony and Opinions of Mr. Walter Bratic filed by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Grinstein, Joseph)
|
December 11, 2009 |
Filing 321
MOTION to Expedite Briefing and Consideration of Google's Daubert Motion to Exclude Certain Testimony and Opinions of Mr. Walter Bratic by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Candido, Amy)
|
December 11, 2009 |
Filing 320
ORDER denying 189 Sealed Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 12/11/09. (ch, )
|
December 10, 2009 |
Filing 319
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of PRE-TRIAL HEARING held on 12/4/09 before Judge Chad Everingham. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR,Telephone number: (903) 663-5082. (100 pgs.)NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/3/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/13/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/13/2010. (tja, )
|
December 9, 2009 |
Filing 318
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jessica Lea Hannah on behalf of Function Media, L.L.C. (Hannah, Jessica)
|
December 7, 2009 |
Filing 317
SEALED SURREPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 207 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement filed by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Tribble, Max)
|
December 7, 2009 |
Filing 316
SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 275 SEALED MOTION to Compel Previously-Taken Deposition Testimony of Google Executives filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B)(Candido, Amy)
|
December 7, 2009 |
Filing 315
SEALED SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 201 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment on Validity of Patents filed by Google, Inc.. (DeFranco, Edward) Modified on 12/8/2009 (ch, ).
|
December 7, 2009 |
Filing 314
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 192 Dft Google Inc Motion to Limit the number of asserted claims. The plaintiff Function Media, L.L.C. shall limit the number of asserted claims for trial to a total of nine across both patents. The plaintiff shall notify the defendant by 12/11/09 at 12:00pm which patent claims it will assert at trial. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 12/7/09. (ch, )
|
December 7, 2009 |
Filing 313
ORDER granting 312 Googles Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadline For Googles Opposition To Function Medias Motion to Compel Previously-Taken Deposition Testimony. The deadline for Googles Opposition to Function Medias Motion to Compel Previously-Taken Deposition Testimony will be December 7, 2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 12/7/09. (ljw, )
|
December 4, 2009 |
Filing 312
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 275 SEALED MOTION to Compel Previously-Taken Deposition Testimony of Google Executives by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Candido, Amy)
|
December 4, 2009 |
Filing 311
ORDER granting 271 Sealed Motion to Compel Deposition of Google Executives. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 12/4/09. (ch, )
|
December 4, 2009 |
Filing 310
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 12/4/2009.(Court Reporter Shelly Holmes.)(Attachments: #(1) sign-in sheet)(delat)
|
December 4, 2009 |
Filing 309
NOTICE of Hearing: Hearing on pre-admission of exhibits and depo designations set for 1/5/2010, 09:00 AM, in Mag Ctrm (Marshall) before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham.(delat)
|
December 3, 2009 |
Filing 308
SEALED Notice of Corrected Exhibit to Main Document: 307 Sealed Response to Motion re 271 Supplemental SEALED MOTION to Compel Depositions of Google Executives. (Attachments: # 1 Corrected Exhibit C)(Candido, Amy)
|
December 1, 2009 |
Filing 307
SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 271 Supplemental(SEALED MOTION to Compel Depositions of Google Executives Supplemental Motion to Compel filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I-1, # 10 Exhibit I-2)(Candido, Amy) (Clerk modified to link to 271 and not 272 per request from atty)Modified on 12/3/2009 (ch, ).
|
December 1, 2009 |
Filing 306
SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 190 MOTION to Seal Documents and Close the Courtroom During Presentation of Confidential Material at Trial filed by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Burns, Warren)
|
December 1, 2009 |
Filing 305
ORDER granting 285 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 12/1/09. (ch, )
|
December 1, 2009 |
Filing 304
ORDER granting 286 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 190 MOTION to Seal Documents and Close the Courtroom During Presentation of Confidential Material at Trial Responses due by 12/1/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 12/1/09. (ch, )
|
December 1, 2009 |
Filing 303
ORDER granting 301 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 12/1/09. (ch, )
|
November 30, 2009 |
Filing 302
***REPLACES # 290 ***Sealed Document. Notice of Filing of Declaration of Michael J. Wagner and Expert Report in Support of Replies to Googles Motions in Limine Nos. 3, 10 & 11. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michael J. Wagner, # 2 Exhibit A)(Candido, Amy) Modified on 12/1/2009 (ch, ).
|
November 30, 2009 |
Filing 301
Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Function Media's Surreply to Google's Motion to Seal Documents and Close the Courtroom During Presentation of Confidential Information at Trial by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Burns, Warren)
|
November 30, 2009 |
NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the 290 submitted NO CERTIFICATE OF AUTHORIZATION TO SEAL OR CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OR SIGNATURE PAGE. Correction should be made by one business day (ch, )
|
November 25, 2009 |
Filing 300
SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 204 MOTION in Limine No. Three: Motion to Exclude Plaintiff from Asserting Any "Secondary Considerations" of Non-Obviousness filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Errata A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Candido, Amy)
|
November 25, 2009 |
Filing 299
SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 193 SEALED MOTION in LImine No. 6: Motion to Preclude Evidence and Argument Regarding Credit for Invention of the Accused Products filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(DeFranco, Edward)
|
November 25, 2009 |
Filing 298
SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 205 MOTION in Limine No. Two: Motion in Limine to Preclude Function Media from Introducing Evidence and Argument that Google Infringes the Asserted Claims Under the Doctrine of Equivalents filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Candido, Amy)
|
November 25, 2009 |
Filing 297
SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 199 MOTION in Limine No. Eleven: Motion to Exclude Evidence of Google's Size, Wealth and Overall Revenues filed by Google, Inc.. (Perlson, David)
|
November 25, 2009 |
Filing 296
REPLY to Response to Motion re 197 MOTION in Limine No. Nine: Motion to Preclude Argument that Google Hindered Function Media or its Expert from Testing or Analyzing the Accused Products filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Revised [Proposed] Order)(DeFranco, Edward)
|
November 25, 2009 |
Filing 295
SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 198 SEALED MOTION in Limine No. Ten: Motion to Exclude Allegations of Anticompetitive Activity on the Part of Google filed by Google, Inc.. (Perlson, David)
|
November 25, 2009 |
Filing 294
REPLY to Response to Motion re 200 MOTION in Limine No. Five: Motion to Admit Evidence Regarding the Reexamination of the Patents-In-Suit filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Part 1, # 2 Exhibit A Part 2)(Candido, Amy)
|
November 25, 2009 |
Filing 293
SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 196 SEALED MOTION in Limine No. Eight: Motion to Preclude Evidence and Argument Relating to Google's Alleged Copying of the Invention filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(DeFranco, Edward)
|
November 25, 2009 |
Filing 292
SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 194 SEALED MOTION in Limine No. 7: Motion to Exclude Evidence of Google's Independent Patent Activities filed by Google, Inc.. (DeFranco, Edward)
|
November 25, 2009 |
Filing 291
REPLY to Response to Motion re 206 MOTION in Limine No. One: Motion to Preclude Evidence and Argument Relating to The Parties' Conduct During Discovery filed by Google, Inc.. (Candido, Amy)
|
November 25, 2009 |
Filing 290
***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT. NO SIGNATURE PAGE, AND NO CERTIFICATE OF AUTHORIZATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL AND NO CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. PLEASE IGNORE.***Sealed Document. Declaration of Michael J. Wagner (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Perlson, David) Modified on 11/30/2009 (ch, ).
|
November 25, 2009 |
Filing 289
SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 207 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration and Expert Rebuttal Report of Mark Lanning, # 2 Appendices 1-7 to Expert Rebuttal Report of Mark Lanning, # 3 Exhibit 1 to Expert Rebuttal Report of Mark Lanning, # 4 Exhibit 2 to Expert Rebuttal Report of Mark Lanning, # 5 Exhibit 3 to Expert Rebuttal Report of Mark Lanning, # 6 Exhibits 4&5 to Expert Rebuttal Report of Mark Lanning)(DeFranco, Edward)
|
November 25, 2009 |
Filing 288
SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 188 SEALED MOTION in Limine filed by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit C1, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F)(Tribble, Max)
|
November 25, 2009 |
Filing 287
SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 201 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment on Validity of Patents filed by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit AA, # 2 Exhibit BB, # 3 Exhibit CC, # 4 Exhibit DD, # 5 Exhibit EE, # 6 Exhibit FF, # 7 Exhibit GG, # 8 Exhibit HH, # 9 Exhibit II, # 10 Exhibit JJ, # 11 Exhibit KK, # 12 Exhibit LL, # 13 Exhibit MM, # 14 Exhibit NN, # 15 Exhibit OO, # 16 Exhibit PP, # 17 Exhibit QQ)(Tribble, Max)
|
November 25, 2009 |
Filing 286
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 190 MOTION to Seal Documents and Close the Courtroom During Presentation of Confidential Material at Trial by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Burns, Warren)
|
November 25, 2009 |
Filing 285
Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Grinstein, Joseph)
|
November 24, 2009 |
Filing 284
ORDER granting 281 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Juanita R Brooks and Thomas Bernard Walsh, IV terminated as counsel for Google, Inc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 11/24/09. (ch, )
|
November 24, 2009 |
Filing 283
ORDER granting 282 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Briefs in Support of Motion in Limine, Certain Dispositive Motion Reply Briefs and Rebuttal Expert Reports. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 11/24/09. (ch, )
|
November 23, 2009 |
Filing 282
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply Briefs in Support of Motions in Limine, Certain Dispositive Motion Reply Briefs, and Rebuttal Expert Reports by Function Media, L.L.C., Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Candido, Amy)
|
November 23, 2009 |
Filing 281
Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wolff, Jason)
|
November 23, 2009 |
Filing 280
***REPLACES DOCUMENT # 279 WHICH WAS FILED IN ERROR***SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 195 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment of No Inequitable Conduct filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Affidavit of James Glass, # 2 Exhibit N)(DeFranco, Edward) Modified on 11/23/2009 (ehs, ).
|
November 20, 2009 |
Filing 279
***FILED IN ERROR. SEE CORRECTED DOCUMENT # 280 ***SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 195 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment of No Inequitable Conduct filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of James Glass, # 2 Exhibit N)(DeFranco, Edward) Modified on 11/23/2009 (ehs, ).
|
November 20, 2009 |
Filing 278
Sealed Document. Googles Notice of Correction to Googles Opposition To Function Media L.L.C.s Motion For Summary Judgment Of No Inequitable Conduct (Anderson, Carl)
|
November 20, 2009 |
Filing 277
***REPLACES DOCUMENT # 276 WHICH WAS FILED IN ERROR***Sealed Document. Joint Final Pre-Trial Order (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B part 1, # 3 Exhibit B part 2, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I - part 1, # 11 Exhibit I - part 2, # 12 Exhibit J, # 13 Exhibit K, # 14 Exhibit L, # 15 Exhibit M, # 16 Exhibit N, # 17 Exhibit O, # 18 Exhibit P, # 19 Exhibit Q, # 20 Exhibit R)(Anderson, Carl) Modified on 11/23/2009 (ehs, ).
|
November 20, 2009 |
Filing 276
***FILED IN ERROR. SEE CORRECTED DOCUMENT # 277 *** -DOCUMENT SEALED PER ATTORNEYS REQUEST***Proposed Pretrial Order by Function Media, L.L.C., Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B part 1, # 3 Exhibit B - part 2, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I - part 1, # 11 Exhibit I - part 2, # 12 Exhibit J, # 13 Exhibit K, # 14 Exhibit L, # 15 Exhibit M, # 16 Exhibit N, # 17 Exhibit O, # 18 Exhibit P, # 19 Exhibit Q, # 20 Exhibit R)(Anderson, Carl) Modified on 11/23/2009 (ehs, ). Modified on 11/23/2009 (ehs, ).
|
November 20, 2009 |
***Document # 273, Order modified to clarify deadlines*** (ehs, )
|
November 19, 2009 |
Filing 275
SEALED MOTION to Compel Previously-Taken Deposition Testimony of Google Executives by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Nos. 1-4, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Compel Previously-Taken Deposition Testimony)(Nelson, Justin)
|
November 19, 2009 |
Filing 274
ORDER granting 272 Motion to Expedite. Opening Brief: November 18, 2009 Responsive Brief: December 2, 2009. Hearing: December 4, 2009. The parties will not file any reply or surreply briefing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 11/19/09. (ehs, )
|
November 19, 2009 |
Filing 273
ORDER granting 270 Motion for Extension of Time to File Surreply. Google's Surreply in Opposition to Function Media's motion for Summary Judgment of No Inequitable Conduct due by 11/20/2009 Replies on Dispositive Motions and Motions in Limine due by 11/23/2009. Deadline for Function Media's Inequitable Conduct Expert Report due 11/25/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 11/19/09. (ehs, ) Modified on 11/20/2009 to clarify order text(ehs, ).
|
November 18, 2009 |
Filing 272
Agreed MOTION to Expedite Supplemental Motion to Compel by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Expedite)(Nelson, Justin)
|
November 18, 2009 |
Filing 271
Supplemental SEALED MOTION to Compel Depositions of Google Executives by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Nos. 1-9, # 2 Exhibit Nos. 10-21, # 3 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Compel)(Nelson, Justin)
|
November 18, 2009 |
Filing 270
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 201 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment on Validity of Patents, 195 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment of No Inequitable Conduct, 207 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement and Motions in Limine by Function Media, L.L.C., Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Candido, Amy)
|
November 18, 2009 |
Filing 269
ORDER granting 267 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages in its Reply in Support of its Motion to Seal Documents and Close the Courtroom during Presentation of Confidential Material at Trial. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 11/18/09. (ch, )
|
November 17, 2009 |
Filing 268
Sealed Document. Plaintiff's Notice of Correction to Plaintiff's Reply to Google's Opposition to Function Media's Motion for Summary Judgment of No Inequitable Conduct(Grinstein, Joseph)
|
November 16, 2009 |
Filing 267
Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Google's Reply in support of its Motion to Seal Documents and Close the Courtroom During Presentation of Confidential Material at Trial by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Anderson, Carl)
|
November 16, 2009 |
Filing 266
SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 190 MOTION to Seal Documents and Close the Courtroom During Presentation of Confidential Material at Trial filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit A in support, # 2 Affidavit B in support, # 3 Affidavit C in support)(Anderson, Carl)
|
November 13, 2009 |
Filing 265
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 201 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment on Validity of Patents, 207 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement and Motions in Limine by Function Media, L.L.C., Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Candido, Amy)
|
November 12, 2009 |
Filing 264
SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 249 Sealed Additional Attachments to Main Document,,,,,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (corrected))(DeFranco, Edward)
|
November 12, 2009 |
Filing 263
SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 243 Sealed Response to Motion,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit M (corrected))(DeFranco, Edward)
|
November 6, 2009 |
Filing 262
SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 195 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment of No Inequitable Conduct filed by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Grinstein, Joseph)
|
November 6, 2009 |
Filing 261
ORDER granting 258 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply on its Motion to Seal Documents and Close the Courtroom During Presentation ofConfidential Material at Trial. Responses due by 11/16/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 11/6/09. (ehs, )
|
November 6, 2009 |
Filing 260
ORDER granting 257 Motion for Extension of Time to File Rebuttal Expert Witness Designations and Reports. Deadline extended to 11/24/09. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 11/6/09. (ehs, )
|
November 6, 2009 |
Filing 259
ORDER granting 253 Motion to Continue the Final Pretrial Conference and Pre-Trial Deadlines. The Final Pretrial Conference is rescheduled from December 16, 2009, at 9:30 a.m., to December 4, 2009, at 9:30 a.m. The deadline for the parties to file their Joint Pretrial Order, Joint Proposed Jury Instructions and Form of the Verdict shall be November 20, 2009.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 11/6/09. (ehs, )
|
November 6, 2009 |
Set/Reset Hearings: Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/4/2009 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham. (ehs, )
|
November 5, 2009 |
Filing 258
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 190 MOTION to Seal Documents and Close the Courtroom During Presentation of Confidential Material at Trial by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Anderson, Carl)
|
November 5, 2009 |
Filing 257
***REPLACES # 254 & 256 ***Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Rebuttal Expert Witness Designations and Reports by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Joint Motion to Extend Deadline for Rebuttal Expert Witness Designations and Reports)(Salinas, Billie) Modified on 11/5/2009 (ch, ).
|
November 5, 2009 |
Filing 256
***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY. PLEASE IGNORE.***Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Rebuttal Expert Witness Designations and Reports by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Joint Motion to Extend Deadline for Rebuttal Expert Witness Designations and Reports)(Salinas, Billie) Modified on 11/5/2009 (ch, ).
|
November 5, 2009 |
Filing 255
SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 192 MOTION Motion to Limit the Number of Asserted Claims filed by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Grinstein, Joseph)
|
November 5, 2009 |
***FILED IN ERROR. FILED UNDER WRONG EVENT Document # 254, Joint Motion to Continue. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (Attorney needs to refile under correct event)(ch, )
|
November 5, 2009 |
***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY Document # 256, Joint Motion for Extension. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (Attorney will refile)(ch, )
|
November 4, 2009 |
Filing 254
***FILED IN ERROR. FILED UNDER WRONG EVENT. PLEASE IGNORE.***Joint MOTION to Continue Deadline for Rebuttal Expert Witness Designations and Reports by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Joint Motion to Extend Deadlines for Rebuttal Expert Witness Designations and Reports)(Salinas, Billie) Modified on 11/5/2009 (ch, ).
|
November 4, 2009 |
Filing 253
Unopposed MOTION to Continue Reschedule the Final Pretrial Conference and Pretrial Deadlines by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Unopposed Motion to Reschedule Pretrial Conference and Pretrial Deadlines)(Salinas, Billie)
|
November 4, 2009 |
Filing 252
ORDER granting 238 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 11/4/09. (ehs, )
|
November 3, 2009 |
Filing 251
SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 248 Sealed Response to Motion,. (Tribble, Max)
|
November 3, 2009 |
Filing 250
SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 247 Sealed Response to Motion,,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - E30-1, # 2 Exhibit A - E30-2, # 3 Exhibit A - E30-3, # 4 Exhibit A - E30-4, # 5 Exhibit A - E31, # 6 Exhibit A - E32, # 7 Exhibit A - E33, # 8 Exhibit A - E34, # 9 Exhibit A - E35, # 10 Exhibit A - E36, # 11 Exhibit A - E37, # 12 Exhibit A - E38, # 13 Exhibit A - E39, # 14 Exhibit A - E40, # 15 Exhibit A - E41, # 16 Exhibit A - E42, # 17 Exhibit A - E43-1, # 18 Exhibit A - E43-2, # 19 Exhibit A - E43-3, # 20 Exhibit A - E43-4, # 21 Exhibit A - E43-5, # 22 Exhibit A - E44, # 23 Exhibit A - E45-1, # 24 Exhibit A - E45-2, # 25 Exhibit A - E45-3, # 26 Exhibit A - E45-4, # 27 Exhibit A - E46-1, # 28 Exhibit A - E46-2, # 29 Exhibit A - E46-3, # 30 Exhibit A - E46-4, # 31 Exhibit A - E46-5, # 32 Exhibit A - E46-6, # 33 Exhibit A - E46-7, # 34 Exhibit A - E46-8, # 35 Exhibit A - E46-9, # 36 Exhibit A - E47, # 37 Exhibit A - E48, # 38 Exhibit A - E49, # 39 Exhibit A - E50, # 40 Exhibit A - E51, # 41 Exhibit A - E52, # 42 Exhibit A - E53, # 43 Exhibit A - E54, # 44 Exhibit A - E55, # 45 Exhibit A - E56, # 46 Exhibit A - E57, # 47 Exhibit A - E58, # 48 Exhibit A - E59, # 49 Exhibit A - E60, # 50 Exhibit A - E61)(DeFranco, Edward)
|
November 3, 2009 |
Filing 249
SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 247 Sealed Response to Motion,,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - App. 1, # 2 Exhibit A - App. 2, # 3 Exhibit A - App. 3, # 4 Exhibit A - App. 4, # 5 Exhibit A - App. 5, # 6 Exhibit A - App. 6, # 7 Exhibit A - App. 7, # 8 Exhibit A - App. 8, # 9 Exhibit A - App. 9, # 10 Exhibit A - App. 10, # 11 Exhibit A - App. 11, # 12 Exhibit A - App. 12, # 13 Exhibit A - App. 13, # 14 Exhibit A - App. 14, # 15 Exhibit A - App. 15, # 16 Exhibit A - App. 16, # 17 Exhibit A - E1, # 18 Exhibit A - E2, # 19 Exhibit A - E3, # 20 Exhibit A - E4, # 21 Exhibit A - E5, # 22 Exhibit A - E6, # 23 Exhibit A - E7, # 24 Exhibit A - E8, # 25 Exhibit A - E9, # 26 Exhibit A - E10, # 27 Exhibit A - E11, # 28 Exhibit A - E12, # 29 Exhibit A - E13-1, # 30 Exhibit A - E13-2, # 31 Exhibit A - E13-3, # 32 Exhibit A - E13-4, # 33 Exhibit A - E14, # 34 Exhibit A - E15, # 35 Exhibit A - E16, # 36 Exhibit A - E17, # 37 Exhibit A - E18, # 38 Exhibit A - E19, # 39 Exhibit A - E20, # 40 Exhibit A - E21, # 41 Exhibit A - E22, # 42 Exhibit A - E23, # 43 Exhibit A - E24, # 44 Exhibit A - E25, # 45 Exhibit A - E26, # 46 Exhibit A - E27, # 47 Exhibit A - E28, # 48 Exhibit A - E29)(DeFranco, Edward)
|
November 3, 2009 |
Filing 248
SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 204 MOTION in Limine No. Three: Motion to Exclude Plaintiff from Asserting Any "Secondary Considerations" of Non-Obviousness filed by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex. B, # 2 Exhibit Ex. C, # 3 Exhibit Ex. D, # 4 Exhibit Ex. E, # 5 Exhibit Ex. F, # 6 Text of Proposed Order)(Grinstein, Joseph)
|
November 3, 2009 |
Filing 247
SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 201 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment on Validity of Patents filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit Declaration of James Glass, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Errata G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit N (part 1 of 2), # 16 Exhibit N (part 2 of 2), # 17 Exhibit O (part 1 of 7), # 18 Exhibit O (part 2 of 7), # 19 Exhibit O (part 3 of 7), # 20 Exhibit O (part 4 of 7), # 21 Exhibit O (part 5 of 7), # 22 Exhibit O (part 6 of 7), # 23 Exhibit O (part 7 of 7))(DeFranco, Edward)
|
November 3, 2009 |
Filing 246
RESPONSE to Motion re 200 MOTION in Limine No. Five: Motion to Admit Evidence Regarding the Reexamination of the Patents-In-Suit filed by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Grinstein, Joseph)
|
November 3, 2009 |
Filing 245
RESPONSE to Motion re 206 MOTION in Limine No. One: Motion to Preclude Evidence and Argument Relating to The Parties' Conduct During Discovery filed by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Grinstein, Joseph)
|
November 3, 2009 |
Filing 244
RESPONSE to Motion re 193 SEALED MOTION in LImine No. 6: Motion to Preclude Evidence and Argument Regarding Credit for Invention of the Accused Products filed by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Grinstein, Joseph)
|
November 3, 2009 |
Filing 243
SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 195 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment of No Inequitable Conduct filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of James Glass, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Text of Proposed Order)(Candido, Amy)
|
November 3, 2009 |
Filing 242
RESPONSE to Motion re 202 SEALED MOTION in Limine No. Four: Motion To Preclude Evidence and Argument Regarding Function Media's Allegations of Willful Infringement filed by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Grinstein, Joseph)
|
November 3, 2009 |
Filing 241
RESPONSE to Motion re 189 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment That Any Alleged Infringement of U.S. Patent Nos. 6,446,045, 7,240,025, and 7,249,059 Was Not Willful filed by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Grinstein, Joseph)
|
November 3, 2009 |
Filing 240
SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 188 SEALED MOTION in Limine filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Text of Proposed Order)(Candido, Amy)
|
November 3, 2009 |
Filing 239
RESPONSE to Motion re 197 MOTION in Limine No. Nine: Motion to Preclude Argument that Google Hindered Function Media or its Expert from Testing or Analyzing the Accused Products filed by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Grinstein, Joseph)
|
November 3, 2009 |
Filing 238
Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motions in Limine by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Candido, Amy)
|
November 3, 2009 |
Filing 237
SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 205 MOTION in Limine No. Two: Motion in Limine to Preclude Function Media from Introducing Evidence and Argument that Google Infringes the Asserted Claims Under the Doctrine of Equivalents filed by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex. 1, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Grinstein, Joseph)
|
November 3, 2009 |
Filing 236
SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 207 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement filed by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Jeremy Brandon, # 2 Exhibit Ex. A to Brandon Decl., # 3 Exhibit Ex. B to Brandon Decl., # 4 Exhibit Ex. C to Brandon Decl., # 5 Exhibit Ex. D to Brandon Decl., # 6 Exhibit Ex. 1 to Rhyne Decl., # 7 Exhibit Ex. E to Brandon Decl., # 8 Exhibit Ex. F to Brandon Decl., # 9 Exhibit Ex. G to Brandon Decl., # 10 Exhibit Ex. H to Brandon Decl., # 11 Exhibit Ex. I to Brandon Decl., # 12 Text of Proposed Order)(Grinstein, Joseph)
|
November 3, 2009 |
Filing 235
SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 194 SEALED MOTION in Limine No. 7: Motion to Exclude Evidence of Google's Independent Patent Activities filed by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex. A-1, # 2 Exhibit Ex. A-2, # 3 Exhibit Ex. B-1, # 4 Exhibit Ex. B-2, # 5 Exhibit Ex. C, # 6 Exhibit Ex. D-1, # 7 Exhibit Ex. D-2, # 8 Exhibit Ex. E, # 9 Exhibit Ex. F, # 10 Exhibit Ex. G, # 11 Text of Proposed Order)(Grinstein, Joseph)
|
November 3, 2009 |
Filing 234
SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 196 SEALED MOTION in Limine No. Eight: Motion to Preclude Evidence and Argument Relating to Google's Alleged Copying of the Invention filed by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Grinstein, Joseph)
|
November 3, 2009 |
Filing 233
SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 198 SEALED MOTION in Limine No. Ten: Motion to Exclude Allegations of Anticompetitive Activity on the Part of Google, 199 MOTION in Limine No. Eleven: Motion to Exclude Evidence of Google's Size, Wealth and Overall Revenues filed by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex. A, # 2 Exhibit Ex. B, # 3 Exhibit Ex. C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Grinstein, Joseph)
|
October 29, 2009 |
Filing 232
REPLY to Response to Motion re 192 MOTION Motion to Limit the Number of Asserted Claims filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Salinas, Billie)
|
October 26, 2009 |
Filing 231
ORDER granting 230 Motion for Extension of Pretrial Deadlines. Deadlines are extended as set forth herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 10/26/09. (ch, )
|
October 23, 2009 |
Filing 230
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Pre-Trial Deadlines by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Candido, Amy)
|
October 23, 2009 |
Filing 229
ORDER granting 227 Motion for Extension of Time to File Joint Pretrial Order, Joint Proposed Jury Instructions and Form of the Verdict to October 23, 2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 10/23/09. (ehs, )
|
October 23, 2009 |
Filing 228
NOTICE of Hearing: Jury Selection set for 1/4/2010, 09:00 AM, in Mag Ctrm (Marshall) before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham. Jury Trial set for 1/19/2010, 08:30 AM, in Mag Ctrm (Marshall) before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham. Pretrial Conference set for 12/16/2009, 09:30 AM, in Mag Ctrm (Marshall) before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham.(delat)
|
October 22, 2009 |
Filing 227
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Pretrial Order, Joint Proposed Jury Instructions and Form of the Verdict by Function Media, L.L.C., Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Anderson, Carl)
|
October 22, 2009 |
Filing 226
NOTICE by Google, Inc. OF POTENTIAL SCHEDULING CONFLICT (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Anderson, Carl)
|
October 19, 2009 |
Filing 225
RESPONSE to Motion re 190 MOTION to Seal Documents and Close the Courtroom During Presentation of Confidential Material at Trial filed by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Burns, Warren)
|
October 19, 2009 |
Filing 224
RESPONSE to Motion re 192 MOTION Motion to Limit the Number of Asserted Claims filed by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex. A, # 2 Exhibit Ex. B, # 3 Exhibit Ex. C, # 4 Exhibit Ex. D, # 5 Exhibit Ex. E)(Grinstein, Joseph)
|
October 16, 2009 |
Filing 223
NOTICE by Google, Inc. GOOGLE INC.S RESPONSES AND OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF'S PRE-TRIAL DISCLOSURES (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Salinas, Billie)
|
October 16, 2009 |
Filing 222
NOTICE by Function Media, L.L.C. Function Media's Counter-Designations and Objections to Google's Deposition Designations (Tribble, Max)
|
October 16, 2009 |
Filing 221
NOTICE by Function Media, L.L.C. Objections to Google's Trial Exhibits (Tribble, Max)
|
October 13, 2009 |
Filing 220
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Warren Burns on behalf of Function Media, L.L.C. (Burns, Warren)
|
October 9, 2009 |
Filing 219
ORDER - taking under advisement 120 Motion for Protective Order; granting 133 Sealed Motion to Compel; denying 146 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; granting in part and denying in part 153 Motion to Expedite; granting 180 Sealed Motion to Preclude depositions; denying 181 Sealed Motion for leave to take depositions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 10/9/09. (ch, )
|
October 9, 2009 |
Filing 218
MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER regarding the claim construction issues. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 10/9/09. (ehs, )
|
October 8, 2009 |
Filing 217
SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 180 SEALED MOTION to Preclude Depositions and/or Quash Deposition Subpoenas to Intellectual Ventures and Elizabeth Holohan filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Text of Proposed Order)(Anderson, Carl)
|
October 7, 2009 |
Filing 216
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 8/25/09 Markman Hearing before Judge Chad Everingham. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Judy Werlinger, CSR,Telephone number: 979/595-5222. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 10/28/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/9/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/5/2010. (lss, )
|
October 6, 2009 |
Filing 215
SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 181 SEALED MOTION for Leave to Depose filed by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I)(Tribble, Max)
|
October 6, 2009 |
Filing 214
ORDER granting 213 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 10/6/09. (ch, )
|
October 5, 2009 |
Filing 213
Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Applicable to Docket No. 188 by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Grinstein, Joseph)
|
October 5, 2009 |
***FILED IN ERROR. ORDER FILED AS A SEPARATE DOCUMENT Document # 212, Additional Attachments. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
|
October 3, 2009 |
Filing 212
***FILED IN ERROR. ORDERS ARE NOT FILED AS SEPARATE DOCUMENT. PLEASE IGNORE.***SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 207 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement. (Anderson, Carl) Modified on 10/5/2009 (ch, ).
|
October 3, 2009 |
Filing 211
NOTICE by Google, Inc. of Trial Transcript (Salinas, Billie)
|
October 2, 2009 |
Filing 210
SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 207 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit O part 2, # 2 Exhibit O part 3, # 3 Exhibit P part 1, # 4 Exhibit P part 2, # 5 Exhibit Q, # 6 Exhibit R, # 7 Exhibit S)(Anderson, Carl)
|
October 2, 2009 |
Filing 209
SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 207 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit G, # 2 Exhibit H part 1, # 3 Exhibit H part 2, # 4 Exhibit I, # 5 Exhibit J, # 6 Exhibit K, # 7 Exhibit L, # 8 Exhibit M, # 9 Exhibit N)(Anderson, Carl)
|
October 2, 2009 |
Filing 208
NOTICE by Function Media, L.L.C. Notice of Trial Transcript (Grinstein, Joseph)
|
October 2, 2009 |
Filing 207
SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D part 1, # 5 Exhibit D part 2, # 6 Exhibit D part 3, # 7 Exhibit E part 1, # 8 Exhibit E part 2, # 9 Exhibit E part 3, # 10 Affidavit of Patrick D. Curran in Support of Googles Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement)(Anderson, Carl) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/5/2009: # 11 Text of Proposed Order) (ch, ).
|
October 2, 2009 |
Filing 206
MOTION in Limine No. One: Motion to Preclude Evidence and Argument Relating to The Parties' Conduct During Discovery by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion in Limine No. One: Motion to Preclude Evidence and Argument Relating to the Parties' Conduct During Discovery)(Salinas, Billie)
|
October 2, 2009 |
Filing 205
MOTION in Limine No. Two: Motion in Limine to Preclude Function Media from Introducing Evidence and Argument that Google Infringes the Asserted Claims Under the Doctrine of Equivalents by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, Part 1, # 4 Exhibit C, Part 2, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Text of Proposed Order Granting Google's Motion in Limine No. Two: Motion to Preclude Function Media From Introducing Evidence and Argument That Google Infringes the Asserted Claims Under the Doctrine of Equivalents)(Salinas, Billie)
|
October 2, 2009 |
Filing 204
MOTION in Limine No. Three: Motion to Exclude Plaintiff from Asserting Any "Secondary Considerations" of Non-Obviousness by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Google's Motion in Limine No. Three: Motion to Exclude Plaintiff From Asserting Any "Secondary Considerations" of Non-Obviousness)(Salinas, Billie)
|
October 2, 2009 |
Filing 203
SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 201 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment on Validity of Patents. (Attachments: Exhibit E # 1 Exhibit F, # 2 Exhibit G, # 3 Exhibit H, # 4 Exhibit I, # 5 Exhibit J, # 6 Exhibit K, # 7 Exhibit L, # 8 Text of Proposed Order)(Grinstein, Joseph)
|
October 2, 2009 |
Filing 202
SEALED MOTION in Limine No. Four: Motion To Preclude Evidence and Argument Regarding Function Media's Allegations of Willful Infringement by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Text of Proposed Order Granting Google's Motion in Limine No. Four: Motion to Preclude Evidence And Argument Regarding Function Media's Allegations of Willful Infringement)(Salinas, Billie)
|
October 2, 2009 |
Filing 201
SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment on Validity of Patents by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Sandeep Seth in Support of MSJ, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D-1, # 6 Exhibit D-2, # 7 Exhibit D-3, # 8 Exhibit D-4, # 9 Exhibit D-5, # 10 Exhibit D-6, # 11 Exhibit D-7, # 12 Exhibit D-8, # 13 Exhibit D-9, # 14 Exhibit D-10, # 15 Errata D-11, # 16 Exhibit D-12, # 17 Exhibit D-13, # 18 Exhibit D-14, # 19 Exhibit D-15, # 20 Exhibit D-16, # 21 Exhibit D-17, # 22 Exhibit D-18, # 23 Exhibit D-19, # 24 Exhibit D-20, # 25 Exhibit D-21, # 26 Exhibit D-22, # 27 Exhibit D-23, # 28 Exhibit D-24, # 29 Exhibit D-25, # 30 Exhibit D)(Grinstein, Joseph) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/5/2009: # 31 Text of Proposed Order) (ch, ).
|
October 2, 2009 |
Filing 200
MOTION in Limine No. Five: Motion to Admit Evidence Regarding the Reexamination of the Patents-In-Suit by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Text of Proposed Order Granting Google's Motion in Limine No. Five: Motion to Admit Evidence Regarding the Reexamination of the Patents-in-Suit)(Salinas, Billie)
|
October 2, 2009 |
Filing 199
MOTION in Limine No. Eleven: Motion to Exclude Evidence of Google's Size, Wealth and Overall Revenues by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Google's Motion in Limine No. Eleven: Motion to Exclude Evidence of Google's Size, Wealth and Overall Revenues)(Salinas, Billie)
|
October 2, 2009 |
Filing 198
SEALED MOTION in Limine No. Ten: Motion to Exclude Allegations of Anticompetitive Activity on the Part of Google by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Google's Motion in Limine No. Ten: Motion to Exclude Allegations of Anticompetitive Activity on the Part of Google)(Salinas, Billie)
|
October 2, 2009 |
Filing 197
MOTION in Limine No. Nine: Motion to Preclude Argument that Google Hindered Function Media or its Expert from Testing or Analyzing the Accused Products by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Google's Motion in Limine No. Nine: Motion to Preclude Argument that Google Hindered Function Media or its Expert from Testing or Analyzing the Accused Products)(Salinas, Billie)
|
October 2, 2009 |
Filing 196
SEALED MOTION in Limine No. Eight: Motion to Preclude Evidence and Argument Relating to Google's Alleged Copying of the Invention by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Text of Proposed Order Granting Google's Motion in Limine No. Eight: Motion to Preclude Evidence and Argument Relating to Google's Alleged Copying of the Invention)(Salinas, Billie)
|
October 2, 2009 |
Filing 195
SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment of No Inequitable Conduct by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A, # 2 Appendix B, # 3 Affidavit of Joseph Grinstein in Support of MSJ, # 4 Exhibit A, # 5 Exhibit B-1, # 6 Exhibit B-2, # 7 Exhibit C-1, # 8 Exhibit C-2, # 9 Exhibit D, # 10 Exhibit E, # 11 Exhibit F, # 12 Exhibit G, # 13 Text of Proposed Order)(Grinstein, Joseph)
|
October 2, 2009 |
Filing 194
SEALED MOTION in Limine No. 7: Motion to Exclude Evidence of Google's Independent Patent Activities by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Text of Proposed Order Granting Google's Motion in Limine No. Seven: Motion to Exclude Evidence of Google's Independent Patent Activities)(Salinas, Billie)
|
October 2, 2009 |
Filing 193
SEALED MOTION in LImine No. 6: Motion to Preclude Evidence and Argument Regarding Credit for Invention of the Accused Products by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Defendant Google, Inc.'s Motion in Limine No. 6: Motion to Preclude Evidence and Argument Regarding Credit for Invention of the Accused Products)(Salinas, Billie)
|
October 2, 2009 |
Filing 192
MOTION Motion to Limit the Number of Asserted Claims by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Salinas, Billie) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/5/2009: # 5 Text of Proposed Order) (ehs, ).
|
October 2, 2009 |
Filing 191
NOTICE by Google, Inc. Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. Section 282 (Anderson, Carl)
|
October 2, 2009 |
Filing 190
MOTION to Seal Documents and Close the Courtroom During Presentation of Confidential Material at Trial by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Anderson, Carl)
|
October 2, 2009 |
Filing 189
SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment That Any Alleged Infringement of U.S. Patent Nos. 6,446,045, 7,240,025, and 7,249,059 Was Not Willful by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit In Support of Google, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment That Any Alleged Infringement of U.S. Patent Nos. 6,446,045, 7,240,025 and 7,249,059 Was Not Willful, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit N, # 16 Text of Proposed Order Granting Defendant Google, Inc.'s Motion For Summary Judgment that Any Alleged Infringement of U.S. Patent Nos. 6,446,045, 7,240,025, and 7,249,059 Was Not Willful)(Salinas, Billie)
|
October 2, 2009 |
Filing 188
SEALED MOTION in Limine by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Tribble, Max) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/5/2009: # 3 Text of Proposed Order) (ch, ).
|
October 1, 2009 |
Filing 187
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Patrick Curran for Google, Inc.. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-1- 4946)(ehs, )
|
September 29, 2009 |
Filing 186
Additional Attachments to Main Document: 183 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Supplement to Motion to Compel (dkt 133).. (Nelson, Justin)
|
September 29, 2009 |
Filing 185
Google's Sur-Reply in Opposition to Function Media's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Regarding Google's Inequitable Conduct Allegations SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 146 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Regarding Google's Inequitable Conduct Allegations filed by Google, Inc.. (Gillam, Harry)
|
September 29, 2009 |
NOTICE of DEFICIENCY regarding the #184 Sealed Surreply submitted by Google, Inc.. No cert of authority to seal. Correction should be made by 1 business day and refiled. (sm, )
|
September 28, 2009 |
Filing 184
***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT, PLEASE IGNORE.***Google's Sur-Reply in Opposition to Function Media's Motion for Judgement on the Pleadings Regarding Google's Inequitable Conduct Allegations SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 146 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Regarding Google's Inequitable Conduct Allegations filed by Google, Inc.. (Gillam, Harry) Modified on 9/29/2009 (sm, ).
|
September 28, 2009 |
Filing 183
SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Supplement to Motion to Compel (dkt 133) by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (supplemental brief), # 2 Exhibit A (to supplemental brief), # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Justin)
|
September 22, 2009 |
Filing 182
ORDER granting 178 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 9/22/09. (ehs, )
|
September 21, 2009 |
Filing 181
SEALED MOTION for Leave to Depose by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit in Support, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Text of Proposed Order)(Anderson, Carl)
|
September 21, 2009 |
Filing 180
***REPLACES # 179 *** SEALED MOTION to Preclude Depositions and/or Quash Deposition Subpoenas to Intellectual Ventures and Elizabeth Holohan by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Text of Proposed Order)(Tribble, Max) Modified on 9/21/2009 (ch, ).
|
September 21, 2009 |
Filing 179
***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT. NO CERTIFICATE OF AUTHORIZATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL.*** SEALED MOTION to Preclude Depositions and/or Quash Deposition Subpoenas to Intellectual Ventures and Elizabeth Holohan by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Text of Proposed Order)(Tribble, Max) Modified on 9/21/2009 (ch, ).
|
September 21, 2009 |
NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the 179 submitted by Function Media, L.L.C.. NO CERTIFICATE OF AUTHORIZATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL. Correction should be made by one business day (ch, )
|
September 18, 2009 |
Filing 178
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Joint Motion to Extend)(Nelson, Justin)
|
September 18, 2009 |
Filing 177
NOTICE of Disclosure by Function Media, L.L.C. re Plaintiff's Witness Disclosure (Nelson, Justin)
|
September 17, 2009 |
Filing 176
SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 146 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Regarding Google's Inequitable Conduct Allegations filed by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Grinstein, Joseph)
|
September 15, 2009 |
Filing 175
SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 146 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Regarding Google's Inequitable Conduct Allegations Google's Opposition to Function Media's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Regarding Google's Inequitable Conduct Allegations filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Supplemental Responses to Interrogatories)(Gillam, Harry)
|
September 15, 2009 |
Filing 174
ORDER granting 173 Motion for Extension of Time to File; granting 173 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to pltf's motion for judgment on the pleadings regarding Gogle's Inequitable Conduct Allegations( Responses due by 9/15/2009). Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 9/15/09. (ehs, )
|
September 11, 2009 |
Filing 173
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File, MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 146 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Regarding Google's Inequitable Conduct Allegations by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gillam, Harry)
|
September 8, 2009 |
Filing 172
ORDER granting 171 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply ( Responses due by 9/11/2009). Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 9/8/09. (ehs, )
|
September 3, 2009 |
Filing 171
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File, MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 146 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Regarding Google's Inequitable Conduct Allegations by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gillam, Harry)
|
August 31, 2009 |
Filing 170
REPLY to Response to Motion re 120 MOTION for Protective Order to Preclude Depositions regarding Notice of Supplemental Authority filed by Google, Inc.. (Anderson, Carl)
|
August 31, 2009 |
Filing 169
ORDER denying 162 Motion to Expedite; granting 167 Motion to Withdraw. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on August 31, 2009. (jml)
|
August 31, 2009 |
Filing 168
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Deborah J Race on behalf of Function Media, L.L.C. (Race, Deborah)
|
August 31, 2009 |
Filing 167
***REPLACES # 166 ***Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw 162 MOTION to Expedite Emergency Motion to Set Deadline for Google to Complete Production and Relief from Meet and Confer, 161 Sealed Additional Attachments to Main Document, 160 Emergency MOTION To Set Deadline for Google to Complete Production and Relief from Meet and Confer by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Withdraw Emergency Motion)(Nelson, Justin) Modified on 8/31/2009 (ch, ).
|
August 31, 2009 |
Filing 166
***FILED IN ERROR. ATTORNEY MUST FILE A MOTION. PLEASE IGNORE.NOTICE by Function Media, L.L.C. re 160 Emergency MOTION To Set Deadline for Google to Complete Production and Relief from Meet and Confer to Withdraw Emergency Motion (Nelson, Justin) Modified on 8/31/2009 (ch, ).
|
August 31, 2009 |
***FILED IN ERROR. ATTORNEY MUST FILE A MOTION TO WITHDRAW Document # 166, Notice. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
|
August 28, 2009 |
Filing 165
RESPONSE to Motion re 120 MOTION for Protective Order to Preclude Depositions "Response to Supplemental Authority on Protective Order" filed by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Nelson, Justin)
|
August 28, 2009 |
Filing 164
NOTICE by Google, Inc. re 120 MOTION for Protective Order to Preclude Depositions of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Anderson, Carl)
|
August 28, 2009 |
Filing 163
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Billie D Salinas for Google, Inc.. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-1-4886) (ehs, )
|
August 27, 2009 |
Filing 162
MOTION to Expedite Emergency Motion to Set Deadline for Google to Complete Production and Relief from Meet and Confer by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Justin)
|
August 27, 2009 |
Filing 161
SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 160 Emergency MOTION To Set Deadline for Google to Complete Production and Relief from Meet and Confer. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Nelson, Justin)
|
August 27, 2009 |
Filing 160
Emergency MOTION To Set Deadline for Google to Complete Production and Relief from Meet and Confer by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A-D filed separately under seal, # 3 Exhibit E, # 4 Exhibit F, # 5 Exhibit G, # 6 Exhibit H, # 7 Exhibit I, # 8 Exhibit J, # 9 Exhibit K, # 10 Exhibit L)(Nelson, Justin)
|
August 25, 2009 |
Filing 159
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham: Markman Hearing held on 8/25/2009. (Court Reporter Judy Werlinger, CSR.) (Attachments: # 1 Sign-in Sheet) (jml)
|
August 24, 2009 |
Filing 158
***REPLACES # 154 ***RESPONSE in Opposition re 153 Second MOTION to Expedite Motion to Compel filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit in Support of Opposition to Function Media's Second Expedited Motion to Compel, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Text of Proposed Order)(Anderson, Carl) Modified on 8/24/2009 (ch, ).
|
August 24, 2009 |
Filing 157
SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 133 SEALED MOTION to Compel (Extradited) SEALED MOTION to Compel (Extradited) filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Anderson, Carl)
|
August 24, 2009 |
***FILED IN ERROR. ORDERS ARE NOT FILED AS A SEPARATE DOCUMENT Document # 156, Additional Attachments. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
|
August 24, 2009 |
NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the 154 submitted by Google, Inc.. No Ceritificate of Service.. Correction should be made by one business day (ch, )
|
August 21, 2009 |
Filing 156
***FILED IN ERROR. ORDERS ARE NOT FILED AS SEPARATE DOCUMENTS.***Additional Attachments to Main Document: 154 Response in Opposition to Motion.. (Anderson, Carl) Modified on 8/24/2009 (ch, ).
|
August 21, 2009 |
Filing 155
AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re 153 Second MOTION to Expedite Motion to Compel filed by Google, Inc.. (Anderson, Carl)
|
August 21, 2009 |
Filing 154
***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT. NO CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. PLEASE IGNORE.***RESPONSE in Opposition re 153 Second MOTION to Expedite Motion to Compel filed by Google, Inc.. (Anderson, Carl) Modified on 8/24/2009 (ch, ).
|
August 19, 2009 |
Filing 153
Second MOTION to Expedite Motion to Compel by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Justin)
|
August 19, 2009 |
Filing 150
Unopposed MOTION to Expedite Second Motion to Compel by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Justin)
|
August 18, 2009 |
Filing 152
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney James M Glass for Google, Inc.. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-1-4872(ch, )
|
August 18, 2009 |
Filing 151
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Edward J DeFranco for Google, Inc. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-1-4872. (ch, )
|
August 18, 2009 |
Filing 149
SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 133 SEALED MOTION to Compel (Expedited) SEALED MOTION to Compel (Expedited) filed by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10)(Nelson, Justin) Modified on 8/18/2009 (poa, ).
|
August 17, 2009 |
Filing 148
NOTICE by Function Media, L.L.C. re 110 Reply to Claim Construction Brief Notice of Supplemental Authority for Function Media's Markman Briefs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Grinstein, Joseph)
|
August 17, 2009 |
Filing 147
SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 120 MOTION for Protective Order to Preclude Depositions filed by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9)(Nelson, Justin)
|
August 17, 2009 |
Filing 146
MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Regarding Google's Inequitable Conduct Allegations by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Grinstein, Joseph)
|
August 12, 2009 |
Filing 145
SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 133 SEALED MOTION to Compel (Expedited) SEALED MOTION to Compel (Expedited) filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Anderson in Support, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Text of Proposed Order)(Anderson, Carl) Modified on 8/18/2009 (poa, ). Modified
|
August 11, 2009 |
Filing 144
NOTICE by Google, Inc. of Substitution of Lead Trial Counsel (Karas, Stan)
|
August 10, 2009 |
Filing 143
NOTICE by Google, Inc. re 98 Claim Construction Brief, of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Anderson, Carl)
|
August 7, 2009 |
Filing 142
SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 120 MOTION for Protective Order to Preclude Depositions filed by Google, Inc.. (Anderson, Carl)
|
August 6, 2009 |
Filing 141
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sandeep Seth on behalf of all plaintiffs (Seth, Sandeep)
|
July 31, 2009 |
Filing 140
ORDER granting 138 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Parties shall submit their joint P.R. 4-5(d) chart to the Court by August 14, 2009 and their tutorials on DVD to the court by August 17, 2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/31/09. (ehs, )
|
July 31, 2009 |
Filing 139
ORDER granting 121 Motion to Expedite briefing. In light of the re-scheduling of the claim construction hearing for August 25, 2009, the court sets the following briefing schedule for the motion to compel (Dkt. No. 133). Response Due: August 12, 2009. Reply Due: August 18, 2009. Sur-Reply Due: August 24, 2009 at 12:00 p.m. The court will hear oral argument on Google, Inc.s motion for a protective order (Dkt. No. 120) and Function Medias motion to compel (Dkt. No. 133) at the conclusion of the claim construction hearing. Each side will be given 20 minutes to argue its respective position. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/31/09. (ehs, )
|
July 30, 2009 |
Filing 138
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File P.R. 4-5(d) Chart and Technical Tutorials by Function Media, L.L.C., Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Anderson, Carl)
|
July 30, 2009 |
Filing 137
NOTICE of Hearing: Markman Hearing RESET for 8/25/2009, 09:00 AM, in Mag Ctrm (Marshall) before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham.(delat)
|
July 29, 2009 |
***FILED IN ERROR. NO CERTIFICATE OF AUTHORIZATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL - Document # 129, 130, 131, 132, Sealed Motion to Compel, Sealed Response, Sealed Additional Attachments. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ATTORNEY HAS REFILED SEE CORRECTED DOCUMENT'S # 133, 134, 135, 136 )(ch, )
|
July 28, 2009 |
Filing 136
***REPLACES # 125 AND 132 ***SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 134 Sealed Response to Motion,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 8 -part 1, # 2 Exhibit 8 - part 2, # 3 Exhibit 20, # 4 Exhibit 21, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Justin) Modified on 7/29/2009 (ch, ).
|
July 28, 2009 |
Filing 135
***REPLACES # 124 AND 131 ***SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 134 Sealed Response to Motion,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 7, # 2 Exhibit 9, # 3 Exhibit 10, # 4 Exhibit 11, # 5 Exhibit 12, # 6 Exhibit 13, # 7 Exhibit 14, # 8 Exhibit 15, # 9 Exhibit 16, # 10 Exhibit 17, # 11 Exhibit 18, # 12 Exhibit 19)(Nelson, Justin) Modified on 7/29/2009 (ch, ).
|
July 28, 2009 |
Filing 134
***REPLACES # 123 AND 130 ***SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 120 MOTION for Protective Order to Preclude Depositions filed by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6)(Nelson, Justin) Modified on 7/29/2009 (ch, ).
|
July 28, 2009 |
Filing 133
***REPLACES # 122 AND 129 *** SEALED MOTION to Compel (Expedited) by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Justin) Modified on 7/29/2009 (ch, ). Modified on 8/18/2009 (poa, ).
|
July 28, 2009 |
Filing 132
***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE. SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 130 Sealed Response to Motion,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 8 -part 1, # 2 Exhibit 8 -part 2, # 3 Exhibit 20, # 4 Exhibit 21, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Justin) Modified on 7/29/2009 (ch, ).
|
July 28, 2009 |
Filing 131
***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE.***SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 130 Sealed Response to Motion,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 7, # 2 Exhibit 9, # 3 Exhibit 10, # 4 Exhibit 11, # 5 Exhibit 12, # 6 Exhibit 13, # 7 Exhibit 14, # 8 Exhibit 15, # 9 Exhibit 16, # 10 Exhibit 17, # 11 Exhibit 18, # 12 Exhibit 19)(Nelson, Justin) Modified on 7/29/2009 (ch, ).
|
July 28, 2009 |
Filing 130
***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE.***SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 120 MOTION for Protective Order to Preclude Depositions filed by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6)(Nelson, Justin) Modified on 7/29/2009 (ch, ).
|
July 28, 2009 |
Filing 129
***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE.*** SEALED MOTION to Compel (Expedited) by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Justin) Modified on 7/29/2009 (ch, ).
|
July 28, 2009 |
Filing 125
***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT. NO CERTIFICATE OF AUTHORIZATION.***SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 123 Sealed Response to Motion, 124 Sealed Additional Attachments to Main Document,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 8 part 1, # 2 Exhibit 8 part 2, # 3 Exhibit 20, # 4 Exhibit 21, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Justin) Modified on 7/28/2009 (ch, ).
|
July 28, 2009 |
Filing 124
***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT. NO CERTIFICATE OF AUTHORIZATION TO SEAL. PLEASE IGNORE.***SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 123 Sealed Response to Motion,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 7, # 2 Exhibit 9, # 3 Exhibit 10, # 4 Exhibit 11, # 5 Exhibit 12, # 6 Exhibit 13, # 7 Exhibit 14, # 8 Exhibit 15, # 9 Exhibit 16, # 10 Exhibit 17, # 11 Exhibit 18, # 12 Exhibit 19)(Nelson, Justin) Modified on 7/28/2009 (ch, ).
|
July 28, 2009 |
Filing 123
***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT. NO CERTIFICATE OF AUTHORIZATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL. PLEASE IGNORE. ***SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 120 MOTION for Protective Order to Preclude Depositions filed by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6)(Nelson, Justin) Modified on 7/28/2009 (ch, ).
|
July 28, 2009 |
Filing 122
***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT. NO CERTIFICATE OF AUTHORIZATION. PLEASE IGNORE.*** SEALED MOTION to Compel (Expedited) by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Justin) Modified on 7/28/2009 (ch, ).
|
July 28, 2009 |
Filing 121
MOTION to Expedite Consideration of Motion to Compel by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Justin)
|
July 28, 2009 |
NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the 122 submitted by Function Media, L.L.C.. No Certificate of Authorization. Correction should be made by 7/28/09 (ch, )
|
July 28, 2009 |
NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the 124 and 125 submitted by Function Media, L.L.C.. No Certificate of Authorization to file under seal. Correction should be made by 7/28/09 (ch, )
|
July 28, 2009 |
NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the 123 submitted by Function Media, L.L.C.. No Certificate of Authorization to file under Seal. Correction should be made by 7/28/09 (ch, )
|
July 27, 2009 |
Filing 128
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Charles K Verhoeven for Google, Inc. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-1-4837. (ch, )
|
July 27, 2009 |
Filing 127
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney David A Perlson for Google, Inc.. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-1-4837(ch, )
|
July 27, 2009 |
Filing 126
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Amy H Candido for Google, Inc.. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-1-4837(ch, )
|
July 24, 2009 |
Filing 120
MOTION for Protective Order to Preclude Depositions by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit in Support, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit N, # 16 Exhibit O, # 17 Exhibit P, # 18 Exhibit Q, # 19 Exhibit R, # 20 Text of Proposed Order)(Anderson, Carl)
|
July 24, 2009 |
Filing 119
ORDER granting 118 Motion for Extension of Time to File Technical Tutorials on DVD. Parties shall submit their tutorials on DVD to thecourt by August 4, 2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/24/09. (ehs, )
|
July 23, 2009 |
Filing 118
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Techincal Tutorials on DVD by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Anderson, Carl)
|
July 13, 2009 |
Filing 117
ORDER granting 116 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Nancy Claire Abernathy terminated as counsel for Function Media LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/13/09. (ch, )
|
July 10, 2009 |
Filing 116
Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney N. Claire Abernathy by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
|
June 26, 2009 |
Filing 115
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alexandra G White on behalf of Function Media, L.L.C. (White, Alexandra)
|
June 23, 2009 |
Filing 114
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Stan Karas for Google, Inc.. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-1-4769(ch, )
|
June 23, 2009 |
Filing 113
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Diane Doolittle for Google, Inc. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-1-4769. (ch, )
|
June 23, 2009 |
Filing 112
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Carl G Anderson for Google, Inc. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-1-4769. (ch, )
|
June 15, 2009 |
Filing 111
ORDER granting 109 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. The page limitation applicable to Function Medias Markman Reply Brief is extended fromtwenty pages to twenty-three pages (excluding exhibits). Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/15/09. (ehs, )
|
June 11, 2009 |
Filing 110
REPLY to 98 Claim Construction Brief, filed by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Tribble, Max)
|
June 11, 2009 |
Filing 109
Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tribble, Max)
|
June 8, 2009 |
Filing 108
ORDER granting 107 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. ORDERED that the page limitation applicable to Function Medias Markman Reply Brief is extended from ten pages to twenty pages (excluding exhibits). Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/5/09. (ch, )
|
May 20, 2009 |
Filing 106
ORDER granting 102 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Yahoo!, Inc., Function Media, L.L.C.. All claims and counterclaims are dismissed with prejudice. Parties shall bear their own attorneys' fees, expenses and costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 5/20/09. (ehs, )
|
May 20, 2009 |
Filing 105
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Collin Michael Maloney on behalf of Function Media, L.L.C. (Maloney, Collin)
|
May 20, 2009 |
Filing 104
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Otis W Carroll, Jr on behalf of Function Media, L.L.C. (Carroll, Otis)
|
May 19, 2009 |
Filing 103
EXHIBIT P to docket #[98-4] in CD-ROM format as to the Declaraton of Jason W Wolff in Support of Google Inc's Markman Brief (placed with documents that are too large to scan)(ehs, )
|
May 18, 2009 |
Filing 102
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Function Media, L.L.C., Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tribble, Max)
|
May 15, 2009 |
Filing 101
Additional Attachments to Main Document: 98 Claim Construction Brief,.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit J1 - 025 Pros. Hist, # 2 Exhibit J2 - 55543856 to Rosser, # 3 Exhibit K - Claim 47 Substitutions, # 4 Exhibit L1 - Aaddzz Brochure, # 5 Exhibit Aaddzz website, # 6 Exhibit M - AdForceUserGuide, # 7 Exhibit N - 6985882 to Del Sesto, # 8 Exhibit O - 6026368 to Brown)(Brooks, Juanita)
|
May 15, 2009 |
Filing 100
Additional Attachments to Main Document: 98 Claim Construction Brief,.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit H1 - 059 Pros. Hist, # 2 Exhibit H2 - 6167382 to Sparks, # 3 Exhibit H3 - 6119101 to Peckover, # 4 Exhibit I1 - 045 Pros. Hist., # 5 Exhibit I2 - 6038545 to Mandeberg)(Brooks, Juanita)
|
May 15, 2009 |
Filing 99
Additional Attachments to Main Document: 98 Claim Construction Brief,.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit E - Stone Tr., # 2 Exhibit F - Jenevein Decl., # 3 Exhibit G1 - 587 Pros. Hist. Part 1, # 4 Exhibit G1 - 587 Pros. Hist Part 2, # 5 Exhibit G2 - 6401075 to Mason, # 6 Exhibit G3 - 6430603 to Hunter)(Brooks, Juanita)
|
May 15, 2009 |
Filing 98
CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Google, Inc., Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Index, # 2 Exhibit 1 - Summary of Claim Construction Disputes, # 3 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Wolff ISO Markman Brief, # 4 Exhibit A - 045 Re-exam Response, # 5 Exhibit B - 025 Re-exam Response, # 6 Exhibit C - 059 Re-exam Response, # 7 Exhibit D - Dean Tr.)(Brooks, Juanita)
|
May 15, 2009 |
Filing 97
ORDER granting 96 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. ORDERED that the page limitation applicable to Googles responsive claim construction brief shall be extended from thirty pages to forty-five pages (excluding attachments). Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 5/15/09. (ch, )
|
May 12, 2009 |
Filing 96
Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages For Its Responsive Claim Construction Brief by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 order Granting Google's Unopposed Motion For Extension Of The Page Limits)(Wolff, Jason)
|
May 12, 2009 |
Filing 95
***FILED IN ERROR. ORDERS ARE NOT FILED SEPARATELY. PLEASE IGNORE***Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages For Its Responsive Claim Construction Brief, Order Granting by Google, Inc.. (Wolff, Jason) Modified on 5/12/2009 (ch, ).
|
May 12, 2009 |
Filing 94
***FILED IN ERROR. NOT PDF SEARCHABLE AND NO ORDER. PLEASE IGNORE***Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages For Its Responsive Claim Construction Brief by Google, Inc.. (Wolff, Jason) Modified on 5/12/2009 (ch, ).
|
May 12, 2009 |
***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 94, 95, Unopposed Motion for leave to File Excess Pages. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ATTY WILL REFILE)(ch, )
|
May 11, 2009 |
Filing 93
NOTICE by Function Media, L.L.C., Yahoo!, Inc. Withdrawing Dkt Nos. 79 & 83 (Tribble, Max)
|
May 1, 2009 |
Filing 92
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Justin Adatto Nelson on behalf of Function Media, L.L.C. (Nelson, Justin)
|
April 30, 2009 |
Filing 91
RESPONSE in Opposition re 83 MOTION to Compel DISCOVERY INTO NON-ACCUSED TECHNOLOGY filed by Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of M. Lane ISO Opposition to MTC, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17, # 19 Exhibit 18)(Lane, Michael)
|
April 29, 2009 |
Filing 90
ORDER granting 89 Motion for modification to the case schedule. Date for deft's P. R. 4-5(b) responsive claim construction briefs be extended from April 30, 2009, to May 15, 2009, and that the date for Function Medias P. R. 4-5(c) reply claim construction brief be extended from May 13, 2009, to June 11, 2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 4/29/09. (ehs, )
|
April 28, 2009 |
Filing 89
Joint MOTION for Modification to Case Schedule re 45 Order,,, Set Deadlines/Hearings,, by Function Media, L.L.C., Google, Inc., Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wolff, Jason)
|
April 27, 2009 |
Filing 88
ORDER granting Google Inc and Yahoo! Inc's 66 Motion for Leave to File supplement to PR 3-3 and 3-4 disclosures. That Google Inc. and Yahoo!, Inc.'s Second Supplemental Invalidity Contentions and accompanying document production served on Plaintiff by October 29, 2008 are deemed by the Court to be a part of Defendants Invalidity Contentions in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 4/27/09. (ehs, )
|
April 27, 2009 |
Filing 87
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daymon Jeffrey Rambin on behalf of Function Media, L.L.C. (Rambin, Daymon)
|
April 27, 2009 |
Filing 86
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nancy Claire Abernathy on behalf of Function Media, L.L.C. (Abernathy, Nancy)
|
April 24, 2009 |
Filing 85
REPLY to Response to Motion re 79 MOTION for Protective Order Barring Discovery of Non-Accused Products filed by Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jeffrey G. Homrig ISO Reply, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 ISO Reply to Opp)(Homrig, Jeffrey)
|
April 13, 2009 |
Filing 84
RESPONSE in Opposition re 79 MOTION for Protective Order Barring Discovery of Non-Accused Products filed by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tribble, Max)
|
April 13, 2009 |
Filing 83
MOTION to Compel by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Text of Proposed Order)(Tribble, Max)
|
April 9, 2009 |
Filing 82
CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit B (continued), # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit C (continued), # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit E (continued), # 9 Exhibit F, # 10 Exhibit G, # 11 Exhibit G (continued), # 12 Exhibit H, # 13 Exhibit I, # 14 Exhibit J, # 15 Exhibit K, # 16 Exhibit L, # 17 Exhibit M, # 18 Exhibit N)(Tribble, Max)
|
April 9, 2009 |
Filing 81
ORDER granting 80 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. The page limitation applicable to Function Medias opening claim-construction brief isextended from thirty pages to forty-five pages (excluding exhibits). Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 4/9/09. (ehs, )
|
April 6, 2009 |
Filing 80
Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tribble, Max)
|
April 1, 2009 |
Filing 79
MOTION for Protective Order Barring Discovery of Non-Accused Products by Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Decl. of Jeffrey G. Homrig ISO Yahoo!'s Motion, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Homrig Decl., # 3 Exhibit 2 to Homrig Decl., # 4 Exhibit 3 to Homrig Decl., # 5 Exhibit 4 to Homrig Decl., # 6 Exhibit 5 to Homrig Decl., # 7 Exhibit 6 to Homrig Decl., # 8 Exhibit 7 to Homrig Decl., # 9 Exhibit 8 to Homrig Decl., # 10 Exhibit 9 to Homrig Decl., # 11 Exhibit 10 to Homrig Decl., # 12 Text of Proposed Order Granting Yahoo!'s Motion for a Protective Order)(Lumish, Douglas)
|
February 24, 2009 |
Filing 78
ORDER granting 77 Motion for Extension of Time to File Expert declarations regarding Claim Construction issues. Deadline extended to 2/27/09. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 2/24/09. (ehs, )
|
February 23, 2009 |
Filing 77
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File expert declarations regarding Claim Construction Issues. by Google, Inc., Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Homrig, Jeffrey)
|
February 20, 2009 |
Filing 76
ORDER granting 75 Motion for Extension of Time to File expert declarations regarding Claim Construction Issues. Deadline extended to 2/24/09. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 2/20/09. (ehs, )
|
February 19, 2009 |
Filing 75
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tribble, Max)
|
February 3, 2009 |
Filing 74
ORDER granting 72 Motion for partial dismissal of deft Google Inc for infringement of US Patent No 6,829,587 without prejudice. Each party shall bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. FURTHER ORDERED that none of the foregoing shall affect any rights, causes of actions, counterclaims, defenses, or allegations pertaining to the other three patents-in-suit in the above-captioned litigation (U.S. Patents No. 6,446,045; U.S. Patent No. 7,240,025; and U.S. Patent No. 7,249,059. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 2/2/09. (ehs, )
|
January 30, 2009 |
Filing 73
NOTICE by Function Media, L.L.C. Joint P.R. 4-3 Statement (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Tribble, Max)
|
January 30, 2009 |
Filing 72
Agreed MOTION Partial Dismissal (agreed) by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tribble, Max)
|
December 1, 2008 |
Filing 71
NOTICE by Function Media, L.L.C., Google, Inc., Yahoo!, Inc. Regarding Potential Privilege Disputes (Wolff, Jason)
|
November 24, 2008 |
Filing 70
REPLY to Response to Motion re 66 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Further Supplement to Their P.R. 3-3 and 3-4 Disclosures filed by Google, Inc., Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit E)(Wolff, Jason)
|
November 18, 2008 |
Filing 69
ORDER granting 68 Motion for Extension of Time to File Privilege Logs. Deadline extended to 11/17/08. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 11/18/08. (ehs, )
|
November 17, 2008 |
Filing 68
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File To Further Extend Privilege Log Deadline by Function Media, L.L.C., Google, Inc., Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wolff, Jason) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/18/2008: # 2 Revised Proposed Order) (mpv, ).
|
November 13, 2008 |
Filing 67
RESPONSE in Opposition re 66 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Further Supplement to Their P.R. 3-3 and 3-4 Disclosures filed by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Tribble, Max)
|
October 31, 2008 |
Filing 66
Joint MOTION for Leave to File Further Supplement to Their P.R. 3-3 and 3-4 Disclosures by Google, Inc., Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Walsh, Thomas)
|
September 30, 2008 |
Filing 65
ORDER granting 64 Motion for Extension of Privilege Log Deadline. Deadline is extended to 11/17/08. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 9/30/08. (ch, )
|
September 26, 2008 |
Filing 64
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File to Extend Privilege Log Deadline by Google, Inc., Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Powers, Matthew)
|
September 25, 2008 |
Filing 63
ORDER granting 62 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney David J Healey terminated as counsel for Dft Yahoo!. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 9/25/08. (ch, )
|
September 24, 2008 |
Filing 62
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney David J. Healey by Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lumish, Douglas)
|
September 24, 2008 |
Filing 61
NOTICE of Designation of Attorney in Charge to Douglas E Lumish on behalf of Yahoo!, Inc. (Lumish, Douglas)
|
September 18, 2008 |
Filing 60
ORDER denying 20 Motion to Dismiss for reasons stated herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 9/18/08. (ch, )
|
June 30, 2008 |
Filing 59
ORDER granting 58 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Deadline is extended to 7/30/08. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/30/08. (ch, )
|
June 27, 2008 |
Filing 58
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Privilege Log Deadlines and Document Production Deadlines by Google, Inc., Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walsh, Thomas)
|
June 13, 2008 |
Filing 57
ORDER granting 56 Dft's Unopposed Motion for Leave to Supplement P.R. 3-3 and 3-4 Disclosures. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/13/08. (ch, )
|
June 12, 2008 |
Filing 56
MOTION for Leave to File Supplement to P.R. 3-3 and 3-4 Disclosures by Google, Inc., Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walsh, Thomas)
|
May 1, 2008 |
Filing 55
NOTICE by Google, Inc. Notice of Compliance (Walsh, Thomas)
|
April 30, 2008 |
Filing 54
NOTICE by Yahoo!, Inc. NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE (Lumish, Douglas)
|
April 14, 2008 |
Filing 53
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Harry Lee Gillam, Jr on behalf of Google, Inc. (Gillam, Harry)
|
April 9, 2008 |
Filing 52
NOTICE by Function Media, L.L.C. Notice of Change of Firm Name and Electronic Addresses (DeRieux, Elizabeth)
|
March 20, 2008 |
Filing 51
Agreed PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Charles Everingham on 3/20/08. (ehs, )
|
March 14, 2008 |
Filing 50
Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walsh, Thomas)
|
March 7, 2008 |
Filing 49
ORDER granting 48 Motion for Extension of Time to File Protective order. Deadline is extended to 3/14/08. Signed by Judge Charles Everingham on 3/7/08. (ch, )
|
March 5, 2008 |
Filing 48
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Protective Order by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walsh, Thomas)
|
February 26, 2008 |
Filing 47
ORDER granting 46 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Deadline to submit a Protective Order 3/5/08. Signed by Judge Charles Everingham on 2/26/08. (ch, )
|
February 22, 2008 |
Filing 46
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File JOINT MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO SUBMIT PROTECTIVE ORDER by all parties by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Walsh, Thomas)
|
January 24, 2008 |
Filing 45
DOCKET CONTROL ORDER - Amended Pleadings due by 4/20/2009.,Discovery due by 9/18/2009.,Joinder of Parties due by 9/30/2008., Claims Construction Hearing set for 8/12/2009 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham.,Motions due by 10/2/2009.,Proposed Pretrial Order due by 10/22/2009., Jury Selection set for 11/2/2009 09:00AM before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham., Pretrial Conference set for 10/27/2009 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham. Mediation deadline is 10/2/09. All other deadlines are set forth herein. Signed by Judge Charles Everingham on 1/24/08. (ch, )
|
January 24, 2008 |
Filing 44
DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Judge Charles Everingham on 1/24/08. (ehs, )
|
January 23, 2008 |
Filing 43
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joseph Samuel Grinstein on behalf of Function Media, L.L.C. (Grinstein, Joseph)
|
January 22, 2008 |
Filing 42
Joint MOTION Entry of Docket Control and Discovery Orders by Function Media, L.L.C., Google, Inc., Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Docket Control Order# 2 Exhibit B - Discovery Order)(Bunt, Robert)
|
January 9, 2008 |
Filing 41
ORDER - The parties shall submit their proposed docket control and discovery orders to the court on January 22, 2008. The court deems February 5, 2008 to be the date of the initial case management conference. The Disclosure of Asserted Claims and Infringement Contentions is due on February 19,2008.. Signed by Judge Charles Everingham on 1/9/08. (ehs, )
|
January 9, 2008 |
Filing 39
ORDER assigning case to Judge Everintham by consent of the parties for all further proceedings and entry of judgment. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 1/9/08. (ehs, )
|
January 8, 2008 |
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge T. John Ward and Judge Chad Everingham: Status Conference held on 1/8/2008. Parties consented to Judge Chad Everingham. Claim construction hearing date and trial date were given to parties. Parties are to meet and confer regarding a scheduling order and discovery order. (Court Reporter Susan Simmons.) (shd, )
|
January 8, 2008 |
Filing 40
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge T. John Ward and Judge Charles Everingham: Status Conference held on 1/8/08. Counsel for the parties appeared and were asked if they consented to Judge Everingham. Depending on their answer, they were then given Markman and jury selection dates for the appropriate court. The parties are to meet and confer regarding a scheduling order and discovery order, and the parties have 14 days to submit the proposed orders. The Court further instructed the parties that the time for complying with P.R. 3-1 would be 10 days after the date of the parties filing their proposed orders. Court Adjourned. (Court Reporter Susan Simmons) (jml)
|
January 8, 2008 |
Filing 38
CONSENT to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham. (ehs, )
|
December 11, 2007 |
Filing 37
ORDER setting case for a status conference. Status Conference set for 1/8/2008 10:45 AM before Judge T. John Ward and Magistrate Judge Everingham. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 12/11/07. (ehs, )
|
October 17, 2007 |
Filing 36
REPLY to Response to Motion re 20 MOTION to Dismiss / Yahoo!, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss and Strike Function Media's Willfulness Claims, Or in the Alternative for a More Definite Statement filed by Yahoo!, Inc., Yahoo!, Inc.. (Homrig, Jeffrey)
|
October 15, 2007 |
Filing 35
Plaintiff's ANSWER to Counterclaim of Yahoo! Inc. by Function Media, L.L.C..(Capshaw, Sidney)
|
October 15, 2007 |
Filing 34
Plaintiff's ANSWER to Counterclaim of Google, Inc. by Function Media, L.L.C..(Capshaw, Sidney) Modified on 8/12/2008 (mpv, ). Modified on 8/12/2008 (mpv, ).
|
October 11, 2007 |
Filing 33
ORDER granting 31 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Andrew Wesley Spangler terminated . Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 10/11/07. (ehs, )
|
October 10, 2007 |
Filing 32
RESPONSE in Opposition re 20 MOTION to Dismiss / Yahoo!, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss and Strike Function Media's Willfulness Claims, Or in the Alternative for a More Definite Statement filed by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Capshaw, Sidney)
|
October 9, 2007 |
Filing 31
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Function Media, L.L.C.'s Unopposed Motion for Withdrawal of Andrew W. Spangler as Counsel by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Capshaw, Sidney)
|
October 4, 2007 |
Filing 30
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Juanita R Brooks on behalf of Google, Inc., Google, Inc. (Brooks, Juanita)
|
October 4, 2007 |
Filing 29
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jason W Wolff on behalf of Google, Inc. (Wolff, Jason)
|
October 2, 2007 |
Filing 26
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Jeffrey G. Homrig for Yahoo!, Inc. (FEE PAID) 2-1-3059 (ehs, )
|
October 2, 2007 |
Filing 25
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Matthew Douglas Powers for Yahoo!, Inc. (FEE PAID) 2-1-3059 (ehs, )
|
October 2, 2007 |
Filing 24
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Michael Lane for Yahoo!, Inc. (FEE PAID) 2-1-3059 (ehs, )
|
October 2, 2007 |
Filing 23
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Douglas E Lumish for Yahoo!, Inc. (FEE PAID) 2-1-3059 (ehs, )
|
October 1, 2007 |
Filing 28
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Jason W Wolff for Google, Inc. (FEE PAID) 2-1-3061 (ehs, )
|
October 1, 2007 |
Filing 27
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Juanita R Brooks for Google, Inc.. (FEE PAID) 2-1-3061(ehs, )
|
September 24, 2007 |
Filing 22
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Yahoo!, Inc. identifying Capital Research and Management Company as Corporate Parent and the beneficial owner of 10 percent or more of the shares of Yahoo!'s Common Stock.(Healey, David) Modified on 9/25/2007 (mpv, ).
|
September 24, 2007 |
Filing 21
Defendant Yahoo!, Inc.'s ANSWER to Amended Complaint Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM /Counterclaims against Function Media, L.L.C. by Yahoo!, Inc..(Healey, David)
|
September 24, 2007 |
Filing 20
MOTION to Dismiss / Yahoo!, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss and Strike Function Media's Willfulness Claims, Or in the Alternative for a More Definite Statement by Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Healey, David)
|
September 24, 2007 |
Filing 19
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Google, Inc. identifying None as Corporate Parent. (Walsh, Thomas) Modified on 9/25/2007 (mpv, ).
|
September 24, 2007 |
Filing 18
ANSWER to Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Function Media, L.L.C. by Google, Inc..(Walsh, Thomas)
|
August 10, 2007 |
Filing 17
E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Function Media, L.L.C.. Yahoo!, Inc. served on 7/30/2007, answer due 8/20/2007. (ehs, )
|
August 10, 2007 |
Filing 16
E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Function Media, L.L.C.. Google, Inc. served on 7/30/2007, answer due 8/20/2007. (ehs, )
|
July 30, 2007 |
Filing 15
STIPULATION Extending Time for Defendants Google, Inc. and Yahoo!, Inc. to Respond by Function Media, L.L.C.. (DeRieux, Elizabeth)
|
July 26, 2007 |
Filing 14
ORDER granting 11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Google and Yahoo deadline is extended to 9/24/07 . Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 7/26/07. (ch, )
|
July 26, 2007 |
Answer Due Deadline Updated for Google, Inc. to 9/24/2007; Yahoo!, Inc. to 9/24/2007. (ch, )
|
July 25, 2007 |
E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Google, Inc., Yahoo!, Inc.. (ch, )
|
July 24, 2007 |
Filing 13
Form mailed to Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks. (ehs, )
|
July 24, 2007 |
Filing 12
AMENDED COMPLAINT (First Amended Complaint for Patent Infringement) against Google, Inc., Yahoo!, Inc., filed by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B1# 3 Exhibit B2# 4 Exhibit C# 5 Exhibit D1# 6 Exhibit D2# 7 Exhibit D3# 8 Exhibit D4)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
|
July 23, 2007 |
Filing 11
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time for Defendants Google, Inc. and Yahoo!, Inc. to Answer or Otherwise Respond) by Function Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
|
July 17, 2007 |
Filing 10
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrew Wesley Spangler on behalf of Function Media, L.L.C. (Spangler, Andrew)
|
July 17, 2007 |
Filing 9
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sidney Calvin Capshaw, III on behalf of Function Media, L.L.C. (Capshaw, Sidney)
|
July 17, 2007 |
Filing 8
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Elizabeth L DeRieux on behalf of Function Media, L.L.C. (DeRieux, Elizabeth)
|
July 12, 2007 |
Filing 5
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Charles Ainsworth on behalf of Function Media, L.L.C. (Ainsworth, Charles)
|
July 12, 2007 |
Filing 4
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert Christopher Bunt on behalf of Function Media, L.L.C. (Bunt, Robert)
|
July 12, 2007 |
Filing 3
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Franklin Jones, Jr on behalf of Function Media, L.L.C. (Jones, Franklin)
|
July 11, 2007 |
Filing 7
E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Function Media, L.L.C.. Google, Inc. served by Process Server on 7/5/2007, answer due 7/25/2007. (ch, )
|
July 11, 2007 |
Filing 6
E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Function Media, L.L.C.. Yahoo!, Inc. served by Process Server on 7/5/2007, answer due 7/25/2007. (ch, )
|
July 3, 2007 |
Filing fee: $ 350.00, receipt number 2-1-2726 (ch, )
|
July 3, 2007 |
Filing 2
Form mailed to Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks. (ehs, )
|
July 3, 2007 |
Filing 1
COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Google, Inc., Yahoo!, Inc. (Filing fee $ 350.) , filed by Function Media, L.L.C. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A pt 1# 2 Exhibit A pt 2# 3 Exhibit A pt 3# 4 Exhibit A pt 4# 5 Exhibit B pt 1# 6 Exhibit B pt 2# 7 Exhibit B pt 3# 8 Exhibit B pt 4# 9 Exhibit C pt 1# 10 Exhibit C pt 2# 11 Exhibit C pt 3# 12 Exhibit C pt 4# 13 Civil Cover Sheet)(ehs, )
|
July 3, 2007 |
E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Google, Inc., Yahoo!, Inc.. (ehs, )
|