International Printer Corp v. Brother International Corp et al
Plaintiff: International Printer Corporation
Defendant: Hewlett-Packard Co., Muratec America, Inc., Xerox Corporation, Oce N.V., Brother International Corporation, Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Panasonic Corporation of North America, Murata Machinery, LTD, Matsushita Electric Industrial Co. LTD, Epson America, Inc., OKI Data Corporation, Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba America Business Solutions, Inc., Eastman Kodak Company, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Oki Data Americas, Inc., Seiko Epson Corporation, Dell Inc. doing business as Dell Computer Inc., Oce North America, Inc. and Brother Industries, LTD.
Counter Defendant: MWA Intelligence, Inc., The Weinberger Group LLC, Acacia Patent Acquisition Corporation and Acacia Research Corporation
Counter Claimant: Dell Inc.
Case Number: 2:2007cv00361
Filed: August 20, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Marshall Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: T John Ward
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2009. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 353 ORDER DISMISSING CASE - all claims and counterclaims between the Plaintiff andDefendants in this case have been settled and dismissed. All pending motions, therefore, are DENIED as MOOT. The Court orders that this case be closed. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 9/29/09. (ehs, )
August 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 352 ORDER granting #351 Motion to Dismiss. All claims asserted by International Printer Corp. against Xerox Corp., and all counterclaims asserted by Xerox Corp. against International Printer Corp. are hereby dismissed with prejudice. Each party will bear its own costs and attorneys fees. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 8/14/09. (ch, )
August 13, 2009 Filing 351 Joint MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice regarding Xerox Corp. by International Printer Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Armon, Orion)
July 15, 2009 Filing 350 NOTICE of Settlement by Xerox Corporation, International Printer Corporation (Bunt, Robert)
July 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 349 ORDER that parties have 30 days from the date of this order to submit any closing papers, including a stipulation of dismissal and denying as moot all pending Motions - terminated: #348 Joint MOTION TO SUSPEND ALL CASE DEADLINES AND OBLIGATIONS filed by Xerox Corporation, International Printer Corporation, #329 SEALED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by International Printer Corporation. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 7/14/09. (ehs, )
July 13, 2009 Filing 348 Joint MOTION TO SUSPEND ALL CASE DEADLINES AND OBLIGATIONS by Xerox Corporation, International Printer Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bunt, Robert)
July 10, 2009 Filing 347 NOTICE of Disclosure by International Printer Corporation Pursuant to P.R. 4-1 (Armon, Orion)
July 10, 2009 Filing 346 NOTICE of Disclosure by Xerox Corporation Service of P.R. 4-1 Disclosures (Bunt, Robert)
July 6, 2009 Filing 345 AMENDED ANSWER to #250 Amended Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against International Printer Corporation by Xerox Corporation. (Bunt, Robert)
June 5, 2009 Filing 344 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re #329 SEALED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by Xerox Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Jennifer L. Dzwonczyk, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Bunt, Robert)
June 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 343 ORDER granting #342 Motion to Dismiss defts Oce' North America Inc and Oce' N.V. with prejudice, each party will bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 6/3/09. (ehs, )
June 2, 2009 Filing 342 Joint MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice regarding Oce North America, Inc. and Oce N.V. by International Printer Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Armon, Orion)
May 26, 2009 Filing 341 ***REPLACES #340 ***SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #329 SEALED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by International Printer Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Of Orion Armon, #2 Exhibit 1 to Armon Declaration, #3 Exhibit 2 to Armon Declaration)(Armon, Orion) Modified on 5/27/2009 (ch, ).
May 26, 2009 Filing 340 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT. PLEASE IGNORE***SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #329 SEALED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by International Printer Corporation. Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Orion Armon, #2 Exhibit 1 to Armon Declaration, #3 Exhibit 2 to Armon Declaration)(Armon, Orion) Modified on 5/26/2009 (ch, ).
May 26, 2009 ***FILED IN ERROR. OVER PAGE LIMITS Document # 340, Reply to Response. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ATTORNEY WILL REFILE)(ch, )
May 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 339 ORDER denying #330 Motion to Compel. The court reviewed the submissions of the parties and DENIES the Motion to Comel. IPC has no duty to supplement its interrogatories at this stage of the case. Accordingly, the COURT CANCELS THE HEARING ON 5/21/09. Futher, the court sua sponte modifies the Docket Control Order in this case as follows herein. Trial date and other dates are to remain the same. Additionally, Xerox shall confirm within 60 days of this order, in writing to IPC, that it has completed all of its document production required pursuant to the discovery order in this case and the Patent Rules. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 5/20/09. (ch, ) Modified on 5/20/2009 (ch, ).
May 15, 2009 Filing 338 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #330 Opposed MOTION to Compel Plaintiff to Supplement its Interrogatory Responses : Motion Hearing set for 5/21/2009 at 11:00 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge T. John Ward. (shd, )
May 13, 2009 Filing 337 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #330 Opposed MOTION to Compel Plaintiff to Supplement its Interrogatory Responses filed by International Printer Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Orion Armon, #2 Exhibit 1 to Armon Declaration, #3 Exhibit 2 to Armon Declaration, #4 Exhibit 3 to Armon Declaration, #5 Exhibit 4 to Armon Declaration, #6 Exhibit 5 to Armon Declaration, #7 Exhibit 6 to Armon Declaration, #8 Exhibit 7 to Armon Declaration, #9 Exhibit 8 to Armon Declaration, #10 Exhibit 9 to Armon Declaration, #11 Exhibit 10 to Armon Declaration, #12 Exhibit 11 to Armon Declaration, #13 Exhibit 12 to Armon Declaration, #14 Text of Proposed Order)(Armon, Orion)
May 13, 2009 Filing 336 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re #329 SEALED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (XEROX'S OPPOSITION TO IPC'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT THAT ASSIGNOR ESTOPPEL BARS XEROX FROM CHALLENGING THE VALIDITY OR ENFORCEABILITY OF THE WEINBERGER PATENTS-IN-SUIT) filed by Xerox Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Jennifer L. Dzwonczyk, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Text of Proposed Order)(Bunt, Robert)
May 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 335 ORDER granting #334 Motion to Compel. Documents are to be produced to IPC designed Highly Confidential Outside Counsels Eyes Only, under the Courts Protective Order (Dkt. No. 238). Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 5/8/09. (ehs, )
May 7, 2009 Filing 334 Unopposed MOTION to Compel Production of Third Party Technical Documents in Xerox's Possession by Xerox Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bunt, Robert)
May 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 333 ORDER granting #321 Motion to Dismiss deft Dell Inc with prejudice. Each party will bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 5/4/09. (ehs, )
May 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 332 ORDER denying #325 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 5/1/09. (ch, )
April 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 331 ORDER regarding motions to be submitted in recently filed patent cases. Proceedures for filing set forth herein. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 4/30/09. (ehs, )
April 28, 2009 Filing 330 Opposed MOTION to Compel Plaintiff to Supplement its Interrogatory Responses by Xerox Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Jim W. Ko, #2 Exhibit A - part 1, #3 Exhibit A - part 2, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K, #14 Exhibit L, #15 Exhibit M, #16 Exhibit N, #17 Text of Proposed Order)(Bunt, Robert)
April 28, 2009 Filing 329 SEALED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by International Printer Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Orion Armon, #2 Exhibit 1 - Laird Deposition, #3 Exhibit 2 - Assignment, #4 Exhibit 3 - Development Contract, #5 Exhibit 4 - US Patent '486, #6 Exhibit 5 - US Patent '265, #7 Exhibit 6 - US Patent '060, #8 Exhibit 7 - US Patent '284, #9 Exhibit 8 - US Patent '383, #10 Exhibit 9 - 2001 Performance Excellence Plan, #11 Exhibit 10 - 2002 Performance Excellence Plan, #12 Exhibit 11 - 2003 Performance Excellence Plan, #13 Exhibit 12 - Xerox Objections and Responses to 3rd Set of Rogs, #14 Exhibit 13 - Jupiter Marketing Strategy, #15 Exhibit 14 - Xerox Objections and Responses to 2nd Set of Rogs, #16 Exhibit 15 - XOG Planned Activities, #17 Exhibit 16 - 2004 Performance Excellence Plan, #18 Exhibit 17 - 2006 Performance Excellence Plan, #19 Exhibit 18 - 2004 Performance Excellence Plan, #20 Exhibit 19 - 2008-01-07 Stacy letter to Xerox, #21 Exhibit 20 - 2008-01-14 Dzwonczyk (Xerox) to Stacy, #22 Exhibit 21 - 2008-01-22 Second Stacy letter to Xerox, #23 Exhibit 22 - 2008-03-31 Email string (Armon-Dzwonczyk), #24 Text of Proposed Order)(Armon, Orion)
April 14, 2009 Filing 328 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #325 Opposed MOTION to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order regarding Claim Construction Deadlines filed by International Printer Corporation. (Armon, Orion)
April 10, 2009 Filing 327 REPLY to Response to Motion re #325 Opposed MOTION to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order regarding Claim Construction Deadlines filed by Xerox Corporation. (Bunt, Robert)
April 6, 2009 Filing 326 RESPONSE in Opposition re #325 Opposed MOTION to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order regarding Claim Construction Deadlines filed by International Printer Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Orion Armon In Support of Opposition to Motion to Revise Docket Control Order, #2 Exhibit 1 to Armon Declaration, #3 Exhibit 2 to Armon Declaration, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Armon, Orion)
March 20, 2009 Filing 325 Opposed MOTION to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order regarding Claim Construction Deadlines by Xerox Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bunt, Robert)
March 20, 2009 Filing 324 ***FILED IN ERROR PER ATTY. PLEASE IGNORE.***Opposed MOTION to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order regarding Claim Construction Deadlines by Xerox Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bunt, Robert) Modified on 3/20/2009 (ch, ).
March 20, 2009 ***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 324, Opposed Motion to Amend. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (Atty will refile)(ch, )
March 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 323 ORDER granting #319 Xerox's Motion for Leave to Supplement its P.R. 303 Invalidity Contentions and P.R. 3-4(B) Prior Art Production. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 3/12/09. (ch, )
March 12, 2009 Filing 322 REPLY to Response to Motion re #319 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File TO SUPPLEMENT ITS P.R. 3-3 INVALIDITY CONTENTIONS AND P.R. 3-4(b) PRIOR ART PRODUCTIONOpposed MOTION for Leave to File TO SUPPLEMENT ITS P.R. 3-3 INVALIDITY CONTENTIONS AND P.R. 3-4(b) PRIOR ART PRODUCTION filed by Xerox Corporation. (Bunt, Robert)
March 6, 2009 Filing 321 Joint MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice Defendant Dell Inc. by International Printer Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Armon, Orion)
March 2, 2009 Filing 320 RESPONSE in Opposition re #319 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File TO SUPPLEMENT ITS P.R. 3-3 INVALIDITY CONTENTIONS AND P.R. 3-4(b) PRIOR ART PRODUCTIONOpposed MOTION for Leave to File TO SUPPLEMENT ITS P.R. 3-3 INVALIDITY CONTENTIONS AND P.R. 3-4(b) PRIOR ART PRODUCTION filed by International Printer Corporation. (Gardner, Eamonn)
February 13, 2009 Filing 319 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File TO SUPPLEMENT ITS P.R. 3-3 INVALIDITY CONTENTIONS AND P.R. 3-4(b) PRIOR ART PRODUCTION by Xerox Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Mittler, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Text of Proposed Order)(Bunt, Robert)
January 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 318 ORDER granting #316 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Consent Motion for Partial Extension of Time for Xeroxs Production of Third-Party Documents be granted and tha Xerox Corporation be given up to and including (1) February 18, 2009, to produce third-party documents already in Xeroxs possession; and (2) March 31, 2009, to obtain and produce third-party technical documents not currently in Xeroxs possession. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 1/21/09. (ch, )
January 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 317 ORDER granting #314 Motion for suspension of all case deadlines and obligations. Deadlines are suspended until 3/3/09. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 1/20/09. (ehs, )
January 20, 2009 Filing 316 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Motion for Partial Extension of Time for Xerox's Production of Third-Party Documents by Xerox Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bunt, Robert)
January 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 315 ORDER granting #313 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 1/16/09. (ehs, )
January 16, 2009 Filing 314 Joint MOTION for Suspension of all Case Deadlines and Obligations by Dell Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Feher, Eugene)
January 15, 2009 Filing 313 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery FOR PARTIAL EXTENSION OF TIME FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS by Xerox Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bunt, Robert)
January 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 312 ORDER granting #311 Motion to Dismiss deft Eastman Kodak Co and all claims and counterclaims with prejudice, each party will bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 1/14/09. (ehs, )
January 12, 2009 Filing 311 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Eastman Kodak Co. with Prejudice by International Printer Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Armon, Orion)
January 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 310 ORDER granting #309 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Brian K Buss terminated as counsel for Dell Inc. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 1/5/08. (ehs, )
December 31, 2008 Filing 309 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Dell Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Prol, Howard) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/5/2009: #2 Revised Proposed Order) (mpv, ).
December 30, 2008 Filing 308 ***FILED IN ERROR; PLEASE IGNORE*** MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Dell Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Prol, Howard) Modified on 12/30/2008 (mpv, ).
December 30, 2008 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding #308 the MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Dell Inc submitted No Certificate of Conference included on document pursuant to Local Rule CV-7(i). Correction should be made by one business day. (mpv, )
December 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 307 ORDER - International Printer Corp., Oc North America, Inc., and Oc N.V. has announced settlement of the dispute between them. They have asked the court to stay the litigation until June 1, 2009, when the settlement money is paid. The parties have until June 1, 2009 to file their motion to dismiss the case as to them. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 12/23/08. (ch, )
December 22, 2008 Filing 306 Joint MOTION to Stay Litigation Between International Printer Corp. and Oce North America and Oce N.V. by International Printer Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Armon, Orion)
November 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 305 ORDER granting #304 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Certain Deadlines. Deadline is extended to 12/31/08. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 11/24/08. (ch, )
November 21, 2008 Filing 304 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Certain Deadlines by Dell Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Feher, Eugene)
November 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 303 ORDER granting #302 Motion to Dismiss. All claims asserted between Pla and Dfts Brother International Corp. and Brother Industries, Ltd are hereby dismissed with prejudice. Each party will bear its own costs and attorney fees. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 11/03/08. (ch, )
October 29, 2008 Filing 302 Joint MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice Re: Brother International Corp., and Brother Industries, Ltd. by International Printer Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Armon, Orion)
October 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 301 ORDER - granting #298 Joint Motion for Suspension of all case deadlines and obligations. The court hereby suspends all case deadlines and obligation between plaintiff and Brother until 11/5/08, so that they may finalize their settlement agreement. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 10/21/08. (ch, )
October 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 300 ***DUPLICATE ENTRY SEE ORDER #301 ***ORDER granting #298 Motion for suspension of case deadlines pending settlement agreement. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 10/21/08. (ehs, ) Modified on 10/21/2008 (ehs, ).
October 21, 2008 ***DUPLICATE ORDER. Document # 300 Order - see Order #301 . PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ehs, )
October 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 299 ORDER granting #297 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Deadline extended to 12/1/08 for Dell Inc to produce documents and respond to pltf's first set of interrogatories. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 10/20/08. (ehs, )
October 20, 2008 Filing 298 Joint MOTION (Joint Motion for Further Suspension of All Case Deadlines and Obligations with Respect to Defendants Brother International Corp. and Brother Industries, Ltd.) by International Printer Corporation, Brother International Corporation, Brother Industries, LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Abernathy, Nancy)
October 17, 2008 Filing 297 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery re Extension of Certain Deadlines by Dell Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Feher, Eugene)
October 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 296 ORDER granting #295 Motion to Dismiss all claims and counterclaims against Hewlett-Packard Co with prejudice, each party will bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 10/14/08. (ehs, )
October 10, 2008 Filing 295 Joint MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice Regarding Hewlett-Packard Company by International Printer Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Armon, Orion)
October 2, 2008 Filing 294 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eamonn Joseph Gardner on behalf of International Printer Corporation (Gardner, Eamonn)
October 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 293 ORDER granting #291 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Patent Local Rule disclosures and discovery shall be suspended for 20 days between International Printer Corp. on the one hand, and Hewlett-Packard Company on the other, for themto finalize their settlement. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 10/2/08. (ch, )
October 2, 2008 Filing 292 NOTICE of Disclosure by International Printer Corporation Pursuant to Discovery Order Sections 3(b) and 3(c) (Armon, Orion)
October 1, 2008 Filing 291 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery regarding Hewlett-Packard Company Due to Settlement Agreement by International Printer Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Armon, Orion)
October 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 290 ORDER granting #289 Motion for suspension of all case deadlines and obligation for 20 days so that they may finalize their settlement agreement. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 10/01/08. (ehs, )
September 30, 2008 Filing 289 Joint MOTION (Joint Motion for Suspension of All Case Deadlines and Obligations with Respect to Defendants Brother International Corp. and Brother Industries, Ltd.) by International Printer Corporation, Brother International Corporation, Brother Industries, LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Abernathy, Nancy)
September 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 288 ORDER denying #225 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 9/30/08. (ehs, )
September 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 287 ORDER granting #284 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Deadline is extended to 1/15/09. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 9/29/08. (ch, )
September 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 286 ORDER granting #278 Motion to Dismiss. All claims asserted by International Printer Corp. against Samsung Electronics America, Inc. and Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., and all counterclaims asserted by Samsung Electronics America, Inc. and Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. against International Printer Corp. are hereby dismissed with prejudice. Each party will bear its own costs and attorneys fees. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 9/29/08. (ch, )
September 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 285 ORDER granting #277 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Product Documents. Deadline is extended to 10/15/08. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 9/29/08. (ch, )
September 26, 2008 Filing 284 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery / Production of Documents by Xerox Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lateef, Monica)
September 25, 2008 Filing 283 Plaintiff's ANSWER to #265 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim of Oce N.V. by International Printer Corporation.(Armon, Orion)
September 25, 2008 Filing 282 Plaintiff's ANSWER to #257 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim of Oce North America, Inc. by International Printer Corporation.(Armon, Orion)
September 25, 2008 Filing 281 Plaintiff's ANSWER to #256 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim of Eastman Kodak Company by International Printer Corporation.(Armon, Orion)
September 25, 2008 Filing 280 Plaintiff's ANSWER to #254 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim of Dell, Inc. by International Printer Corporation.(Armon, Orion)
September 25, 2008 Filing 279 Plaintiff's ANSWER to #253 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim of Xerox Corporation by International Printer Corporation.(Armon, Orion)
September 24, 2008 Filing 278 Joint MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice Re:Samsung Electronics America, Inc. and Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. by International Printer Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Armon, Orion)
September 24, 2008 Filing 277 Consent MOTION For Extension Of Time To Produce Documents by Oce North America, Inc., Oce N.V.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Siebman, Clyde)
September 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 276 ORDER granting #272 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Roderick B Williams terminated. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 9/22/08. (ehs, )
September 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 275 ORDER granting #274 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Deadline to Produce Documents is extended to 10/1/08. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 9/22/08. (ch, )
September 19, 2008 Filing 274 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and for Extension of Time to Produce Documents by Hewlett-Packard Co.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rambo, Rick)
September 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 273 ORDER granting #271 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Dell Inc deadline is extended to 10/31/08 to produce documents pursuant to paragraph 3(b) of the Discovery Order (as amended on 7/23/08) and respond to Plaintiffs First Set of Interrogatories pursuant to Rules 26 and 33 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedures. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 9/19/08. (ch, )
September 19, 2008 Filing 272 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Dell Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Roderick)
September 18, 2008 Filing 271 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery of Certain Deadlines by Dell Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hall, James) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/18/2008: #2 Revised Proposed Order) (mpv, ).
September 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 270 ORDER granting #269 Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to Produce Finanical Documents. Dft Brother Industries, Ltd., and Brother International Corp. have until 10/8/08 to produce the financial data required by paragraph 2 of the courts 7/23/08 Order (Dkt, 227). Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 9/18/08. (ch, )
September 17, 2008 Filing 269 Consent MOTION (Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time for Defendants Brother International Corporation and Brother Industries, Ltd. to Produce Financial Documents) by Brother International Corporation, Brother Industries, LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Abernathy, Nancy)
September 17, 2008 Filing 268 NOTICE by Brother International Corporation, Brother Industries, LTD. (Brother Industries, Ltd. and Brother International Corporation's Notice of Disclosure under P.R. 3-4(a)) (Abernathy, Nancy)
September 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 267 ORDER granting #266 Motion for extension of Certain Deadlines. Samsung Electronics America, Inc. and Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. will have through September 29, 2008 to answer, plead, or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint for Patent Infringement, and through September 29, 2008 to produce technical documents required under Patent Rule 3-4(a). Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 9/16/08. (ch, )
September 12, 2008 Filing 266 Consent MOTION for Extension of Certain Deadlines by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Guaragna, John)
September 10, 2008 Filing 265 ANSWER to #250 Amended Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against International Printer Corporation by Oce N.V..(Siebman, Clyde)
September 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 264 MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER denying Oc'e N.V.'s motion to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 9/9/08. (ehs, )
September 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 263 ORDER granting #260 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer first amended complaint. Deft Hewlett-Packard Co deadline extended to 9/19/08. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 9/9/08. (ehs, )
September 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 262 ORDER granting #255 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Hewlett-Packard Company be given up to and including September 19, 2008, to produce documents. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 9/9/08. (ehs, )
September 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 261 ORDER granting #252 Motion for extension of deadlines. Samsung Electronics America, Inc. and Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. will have through September 15, 2008 to answer, plead, or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint for Patent Infringement, and through September 15, 2008 to produce technical documents required under Patent Rule 3-4(a). Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 9/9/08. (ehs, )
September 9, 2008 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Hewlett-Packard Co. to 9/19/2008. (ehs, )
September 5, 2008 Filing 260 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Hewlett-Packard Co.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rambo, Rick)
September 5, 2008 Filing 259 ANSWER to #250 Amended Complaint, by Brother International Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Capshaw, Sidney)
September 5, 2008 Filing 258 ANSWER to #250 Amended Complaint, by Brother Industries, LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Capshaw, Sidney)
September 5, 2008 Filing 257 ANSWER to #250 Amended Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against International Printer Corporation by Oce North America, Inc..(Siebman, Clyde)
September 5, 2008 Filing 256 ANSWER to #250 Amended Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against International Printer Corporation by Eastman Kodak Company.(Hill, Jack)
September 5, 2008 Filing 255 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Pursuant to Patent Local Rule 3-4(a) by Hewlett-Packard Co.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rambo, Rick)
September 5, 2008 Filing 254 Defendant Dell Inc.'s ANSWER to #250 Amended Complaint, and, COUNTERCLAIM against International Printer Corporation by Dell Inc..(Feher, Eugene)
September 5, 2008 Filing 253 Xerox Corporation's ANSWER to #250 Amended Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against International Printer Corporation by Xerox Corporation.(Lateef, Monica)
August 28, 2008 Filing 252 Consent MOTION for Extension of Certain Deadlines by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Guaragna, John)
August 28, 2008 Filing 251 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #225 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Infringement Contentions filed by International Printer Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Orion Armon in Support of Opposition to Motion to Strike, #2 Exhibit 1 to Armon Declaration, #3 Exhibit 2 to Armon Declaration)(Armon, Orion)
August 21, 2008 Filing 250 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against all defendants, filed by International Printer Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Armon, Orion) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/21/2008: #7 Certificate of Service) (mpv, ).
August 21, 2008 NOTICE re #250 Amended Complaint, Certificate of Service added as an attachment by clerk. (mpv, )
August 18, 2008 Filing 249 NOTICE of Disclosure by Xerox Corporation pursuant to Patent Rule 3-4(a) (Dzwonczyk, Jennifer)
August 18, 2008 Filing 248 REPLY to Response to Motion re #225 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Infringement Contentions filed by Xerox Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. K - 7/7/05 Orion v. Staples Order)(Dzwonczyk, Jennifer)
August 15, 2008 Filing 247 NOTICE of Disclosure by Eastman Kodak Company pursuant to Patent Rule 3-4(a) (Schuck, William)
August 15, 2008 Filing 246 NOTICE of Disclosure by Oce North America, Inc., Oce N.V. (Siebman, Clyde)
August 15, 2008 Filing 245 NOTICE of Disclosure by Dell Inc. Pursuant to Patent Rule 3-4(a) and the May 29, 2008 Discovery Order (Feher, Eugene)
August 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 244 ORDER granting #240 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Dfts Brother Industries, Ltd. and Brother International Corp. have up to and including September 15, 2008 to produce their technical documents as required by Local Patent Rule 3-4(a). Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 8/15/08. (ch, )
August 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 243 ORDER granting #241 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Deadline is extended to 9/5/08. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 8/15/08. (ch, )
August 14, 2008 Filing 242 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Joshua S Bish for Oce North America, Inc. and Oce N.V.(APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 2-1-4021. (ch, )
August 14, 2008 Filing 241 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (Produce Documents Pursuant to P.R. 3-4(A)) by Hewlett-Packard Co.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rambo, Rick)
August 14, 2008 Filing 240 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Produce Documents under P.R. 3-4(a)) by Brother International Corporation, Brother Industries, LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Abernathy, Nancy)
August 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 239 ORDER granting #236 Motion for extension of time to produce documents. Deadline extended to 8/29/08. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 8/12/08. (ehs, )
August 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 238 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 8/12/08. (ehs, )
August 11, 2008 Filing 237 ***REPLACES #235***Joint MOTION for Protective Order by International Printer Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Armon, Orion) Modified on 8/12/2008 (mpv, ).
August 11, 2008 Filing 236 MOTION for Extension of Time to Produce Documents Pursuant to Patent Rule 3-4(a) by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Guaragna, John)
August 11, 2008 Filing 235 ***FILED IN ERROR; PLEASE IGNORE***STIPULATION for Protective Order by International Printer Corporation. (Armon, Orion) Modified on 8/11/2008 (mpv, ).
August 11, 2008 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding #235 the STIPULATION for Protective Order by International Printer Corporation submitted Proposed Orders are not filed separately on the docket, attorney to file a motion for entry of the Protective Order and attach the Protective Order as an attachment. Correction should be made by one business day. (mpv, )
August 6, 2008 Filing 234 RESPONSE in Opposition re #225 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Infringement Contentions filed by International Printer Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration, #3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration, #4 Exhibit 3 to Declaration, #5 Exhibit 4 to Declaration, #6 Exhibit 5 to Declaration, #7 Exhibit 6 to Declaration, #8 Text of Proposed Order)(Armon, Orion)
August 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 233 ORDER granting #232 Motion to Dismiss all claims against Toshiba America Business Solutions Inc and Toshiba Corp with prejudice. Each party will bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 8/1/08. (ehs, )
July 31, 2008 Filing 232 Joint MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice by International Printer Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Armon, Orion)
July 30, 2008 Filing 231 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Jim W Ko for Xerox Corporation. (FEE PAID) 6-1-0014607(ehs, )
July 30, 2008 Filing 230 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Kevin A Mittler for Xerox Corporation. (FEE PAID) 6-1-0014607 (ehs, )
July 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 229 ORDER granting #228 Motion to Dismiss. All claims asserted by International Printer Corp against Oki Data Corporation and Oki Data Americas, Inc., and all counterclaims asserted by Oki Data Corporation and Oki Data Americas, Inc., against International Printer Corp. are hereby dismissed with prejudice. Each party will bear its own costs and attorneys fees. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 7/28/08. (ch, )
July 24, 2008 Filing 228 Joint MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice by Oki Data Americas, Inc., OKI Data Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rozendaal, John)
July 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 227 ORDER granting #223 Motion to Modify discovery order. Court modifies the discovery order as set forth herein. The modifications to the Discovery Order contained herein are limited to IPC and the Joining Defendants, and this Order does not affect the discovery obligations of any otherdefendant in this litigation. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 7/23/08. (ehs, )
July 23, 2008 Filing 226 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #225 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Infringement Contentions.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C [corrected])(Bunt, Robert)
July 22, 2008 Filing 225 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Infringement Contentions by Xerox Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E - Part 1, #7 Exhibit E - Part 2, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Text of Proposed Order)(Bunt, Robert)
July 18, 2008 Filing 224 NOTICE of Disclosure by Hewlett-Packard Co. of Service of Initial Disclosures (Ainsworth, Charles)
July 17, 2008 Filing 223 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #198 Order by International Printer Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Armon, Orion)
July 15, 2008 Filing 222 NOTICE of Disclosure by Xerox Corporation Notice of Initial Disclosure (Bunt, Robert)
July 14, 2008 Filing 221 NOTICE of Disclosure by Eastman Kodak Company (Schuck, William)
July 14, 2008 Filing 220 NOTICE of Disclosure by Brother International Corporation (Defendant Brother International Corporation's Notice of Initial Disclosures) (Abernathy, Nancy)
July 14, 2008 Filing 219 NOTICE of Disclosure by Brother Industries, LTD. (Defendant Brother Industries, Ltd.'s Notice of Initial Disclosures) (Abernathy, Nancy)
July 14, 2008 Filing 218 NOTICE of Disclosure by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD., (Wainscoat, Aaron)
July 14, 2008 Filing 217 NOTICE of Disclosure by Oce North America, Inc., Oce N.V. (Siebman, Clyde)
July 14, 2008 Filing 216 NOTICE of Disclosure by Dell Inc. (Initial Disclosure Statement) (Feher, Eugene)
July 14, 2008 Filing 215 NOTICE of Disclosure by International Printer Corporation (Armon, Orion)
July 14, 2008 Filing 214 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James A Jorgensen on behalf of Hewlett-Packard Co. (Jorgensen, James)
July 7, 2008 Filing 213 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas Milton Croft on behalf of International Printer Corporation (Croft, Thomas)
July 3, 2008 Filing 212 NOTICE of Disclosure by Eastman Kodak Company Joint Notice of Disclosure Pursuant to P.R. 3-3 and 3-4 (Schuck, William)
June 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 211 ORDER granting #209 Stipulation motion to suspend Patent Local Rule disclosures and discovery between International Printer Corporation, Toshiba America Business Solutions Inc and Toshiba Corp. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 6/26/08. (ehs, )
June 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 210 ORDER granting #208 Stipulation motion to suspend Patent Local Rule disclosures and discovery between International Printer Corp, Oki Data Corp and Oki Data Americas Inc pending completion of settlement documents. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 6/26/08. (ehs, )
June 24, 2008 Filing 209 STIPULATION to Suspend Patent Local Rule Disclosures and Discovery Between International Printer Corp., Toshiba America Business Solutions, Inc., and Toshiba Corp. Due to Settlement Agreement by International Printer Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Armon, Orion)
June 24, 2008 Filing 208 STIPULATION to Suspend Patent Local Rule Disclosures and Discovery Between International Printer Corp., Oki Data Corporation, and Oki Data Americas, Inc. Due to Settlement Agreement by Oki Data Americas, Inc., OKI Data Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rozendaal, John)
June 17, 2008 Filing 207 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lawrence Augustine Phillips on behalf of Oce North America, Inc., Oce N.V. (Phillips, Lawrence)
June 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 206 ORDER granting #202 Motion to Dismiss. All claims and courterclaims asserted by plaintiff and dfts Muratec America, Inc and Murata Machinery Ltd's are hereby dismissed with prejudice. Each party will bear its own costs and attorney fees. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 6/5/08. (ch, )
June 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 205 ORDER granting #201 Motion to Dismiss. All claim and counterclaims asserted by plaintiff and dfts Panasonic Corp. of North America and Matsushita Electric Industrial Co. Ltd., MWA Intelligence, Inc or any other third-party are hereby dismissed with prejudice. Each party will bear its own costs and attorneys fees. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 6/5/08. (ch, )
June 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORDER granting #200 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jedidiah Jarrett Rollins terminated as counsel for Dft Brother International Corporation. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 6/5/08. (ch, )
June 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 203 ORDER granting #199 Motion to Dismiss. All claims asserted by International Printer Corp against Epson America, Inc. and Seiko Epson Corp., and all courterclaims asserted by Epson America Inc and Seiko Epson Corp against International Printer Corp are hereby dismissed with prejudice. Each party will bear its own costs and attorney fees. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 6/5/08. (ch, )
June 4, 2008 Filing 202 Joint MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice by Murata Machinery, LTD, International Printer Corporation, Muratec America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
June 3, 2008 Filing 201 Joint MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice Panasonic Corp. of North America and Matsushita Electric Industrial Co. Ltd. by International Printer Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Armon, Orion)
June 2, 2008 Filing 200 Consent MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Brother International Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Abernathy, Nancy)
May 29, 2008 Filing 199 Joint MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice by International Printer Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Armon, Orion)
May 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 198 DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 5/29/08. (ch, )
May 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 197 DOCKET CONTROL ORDER - Amended Pleadings due by 10/13/2009., Discovery due by 5/28/2010., Joinder of Parties due by 9/15/2008., Claim Construction Hearing set for 3/17/2010 09:00 AM before Judge T. John Ward., Motions due by 6/15/2010., Proposed Pretrial Order due by 6/22/2010., Jury Selection set for 7/6/2010 09:00AM before Judge T. John Ward., Pretrial Conference set for 6/29/2010 09:30 AM before Judge T. John Ward. Mediation deadline 5/14/08. All other deadlines are set forth herein. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 5/29/08. (ch, )
May 27, 2008 Filing 196 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Proposed Discovery and Docket Control Orders by International Printer Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Docket Control Order, #2 Text of Proposed Order Discovery Order)(Armon, Orion)
May 27, 2008 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding #195 the NOTICE by International Printer Corporation of Filing Unopposed Docket Control Order and Discovery Order submitted Attorney to refile as a motion for entry of proposed docket control order and discovery order. Correction should be made by one business day. (mpv, )
May 23, 2008 Filing 195 ***FILED IN ERROR; PLEASE IGNORE***NOTICE by International Printer Corporation of Filing Unopposed Docket Control Order and Discovery Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Armon, Orion) Modified on 5/27/2008 (mpv, ).
May 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER granting #181 Motion for Extension of Time to File proposed discovery and docket control orders. Deadline extended to 5/23/08. Signed by Judge Judge T. John Ward on 5/20/08. (ehs, )
May 16, 2008 Filing 193 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jedidiah Jarrett Rollins on behalf of Brother International Corporation, Brother Industries, LTD. (Rollins, Jedidiah)
May 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER - granting #180 Stipulation to Suspend Patent Local Rule Disclosures and Discovery between International Printer Corp, Panasonic Corp of North America, and Matsushita Electric Industrial Co Ltd due to settlement agreements. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 5/16/08. (ch, )
May 16, 2008 Filing 191 NOTICE of Disclosure by International Printer Corporation Pursuant to P.R. 3-1 and 3-2 regarding Defendant Xerox Corp. (Armon, Orion)
May 16, 2008 Filing 190 NOTICE of Disclosure by International Printer Corporation Pursuant to P.R. 3-1 and 3-2 regarding Defendants Toshiba America Business Solutions, Inc. and Toshiba Corp. (Armon, Orion)
May 16, 2008 Filing 189 NOTICE of Disclosure by International Printer Corporation Pursuant to P.R. 3-1 and 3-2 regarding Defendants Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Electronics America, Inc. (Armon, Orion)
May 16, 2008 Filing 188 NOTICE of Disclosure by International Printer Corporation Pursuant to P.R. 3-1 and 3-2 regarding Defendants Oki Data Corp. and Oki Data Americas, Inc. (Armon, Orion)
May 16, 2008 Filing 187 NOTICE of Disclosure by International Printer Corporation Pursuant to P.R. 3-1 and 3-2 regarding Defendants Oce N.V. and Oce North America, Inc. (Armon, Orion)
May 16, 2008 Filing 186 NOTICE of Disclosure by International Printer Corporation Pursuant to P.R. 3-1 and 3-2 regarding Defendants Murata Machinery, Ltd. and Muratec America, inc. (Armon, Orion)
May 16, 2008 Filing 185 NOTICE of Disclosure by International Printer Corporation Pursuant to P.R. 3-1 and 3-2 regarding Defendant Hewlett-Packard Co. (Armon, Orion)
May 16, 2008 Filing 184 NOTICE of Disclosure by International Printer Corporation Pursuant to P.R. 3-1 and 3-2 regarding Defendant Eastman Kodak Co. (Armon, Orion)
May 16, 2008 Filing 183 NOTICE of Disclosure by International Printer Corporation Pursuant to P.R. 3-1 and 3-2 regarding Defendant Dell, Inc. (Armon, Orion)
May 16, 2008 Filing 182 NOTICE of Disclosure by International Printer Corporation Pursuant to P.R. 3-1 and 3-2 regarding Defendants Brother Industries, Ltd. and Brother International Corp. (Armon, Orion)
May 15, 2008 Filing 181 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Discovery and Docket Control Orders by International Printer Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Armon, Orion)
May 12, 2008 Filing 180 STIPULATION to Suspend Patent Local Rule Disclosures and Discovery Between International Printer Corp., Panasonic Corp. of North America, and Matsushita Electric Industrial Co. Ltd., Due to Settlement Agreement by International Printer Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Armon, Orion)
May 12, 2008 Filing 179 STIPULATION to Suspend Patent Local Rule Disclosures and Discovery Between International Printer Corp., Epson America, Inc., and Seiko Epson Corp. Due to Settlement Agreement by International Printer Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Armon, Orion)
May 1, 2008 Filing 178 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney James C Hall for Dell Inc.(APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 2-1-3756. (ch, )
May 1, 2008 Filing 177 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Eugene A Feher for Dell Inc. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 2-1-3756. (ch, )
May 1, 2008 Filing 176 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Paul J Hayes for Dell Inc. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 2-1-3756. (ch, )
May 1, 2008 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge T. John Ward and Judge Charles Everingham: Status Conference held on 5/1/08. Counsel for the parties appeared and were asked if they consented to Judge Everingham. Depending on their answer, they were then given Markman and jury selection dates for the appropriate court. The parties are to meet and confer regarding a scheduling order and discovery order, and the parties have 14 days to submit the proposed orders. Court adjourned. (Court Reporter Susan Simmons.)(delat)
May 1, 2008 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge T. John Ward and Judge Charles Everingham: Status Conference held on 5/01/08. Counsel for the parties appeared and were asked if they consented to Judge Everingham. Depending on their answer, they were then given Markman and jury selection dates for the appropriate court. The parties are to meet and confer regarding a scheduling order and discovery order, and the parties have 14 days to submit the proposed orders. Court adjourned. (Court Reporter Susan Simmons.) (shd, )
April 11, 2008 Filing 175 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Michael Pickett on behalf of Oki Data Americas, Inc., OKI Data Corporation (Pickett, John)
April 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER - This case is set for a Status Conference on May 1, 2008. In keeping with the Court's recent practice, the Court intends to give the parties an opportunity, following the conference, to reach agreements on the Docket Control Order and Discovery Order without having to return for an additional conference with the Court. Accordingly, the Court orders that disclosures under P. R. 3-1 and P. R. 3-2 are due on Friday, May 16, 2008. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 4/11/08. (ehs, )
April 9, 2008 Filing 173 NOTICE by Brother Industries, LTD. Notice of Change of Firm Name and Electronic Addresses (DeRieux, Elizabeth)
April 9, 2008 Filing 172 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Elizabeth L DeRieux on behalf of Brother Industries, LTD. (DeRieux, Elizabeth)
April 7, 2008 Filing 171 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John M Guaragna on behalf of Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD., (Guaragna, John)
April 3, 2008 Filing 170 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kurt Max Pankratz on behalf of Brother International Corporation, Brother Industries, LTD. (Pankratz, Kurt)
April 3, 2008 Filing 169 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Otis W Carroll, Jr on behalf of Eastman Kodak Company (Carroll, Otis)
April 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER - The purpose of the conference will be to assign a claim construction hearing date and a trial setting. The parties shallbe prepared to inform the Court whether they will consent to trial before the Magistrate Judge. Status Conference set for 5/1/2008 09:45 AM before Judge T. John Ward. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 4/3/08. (ehs, )
April 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER finding as moot #157 Motion to Dismiss Panasonic Corp's counterclaims. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 4/1/08. (ehs, )
March 11, 2008 Filing 166 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Douglas Ray McSwane, Jr on behalf of Samsung Electronics Co., LTD., (McSwane, Douglas)
March 11, 2008 Filing 165 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Douglas Ray McSwane, Jr on behalf of Samsung Electronics America, Inc. (McSwane, Douglas)
March 10, 2008 Filing 164 REPLY in Support of Motion to Dismiss to RESPONSE re #157 MOTION to Dismiss Panasonic Corp. of North America's Counterclaims Against MWA Intelligence, Inc. filed by MWA Intelligence, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Second Declaration of Orion Armon In Support of MWA Intelligence, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss#2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Second Armon Declaration)(Armon, Orion) Modified on 3/11/2008 (mpv, ).
March 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER granting #161 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 3/4/08. (ch, )
March 3, 2008 Filing 162 SEALED RESPONSE to #157 MOTION to Dismiss Panasonic Corp. of North America's Counterclaims Against MWA Intelligence, Inc. filed by Panasonic Corporation of North America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1#2 Exhibit 2#3 Exhibit 3#4 Exhibit 4#5 Exhibit 5#6 Exhibit 6#7 Exhibit 7#8 Text of Proposed Order) (Smith, Michael)
March 3, 2008 Filing 161 MOTION for Leave to File Opposition to MWA's Motion to Dismiss Under Seal by Panasonic Corporation of North America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Michael) Additional attachment(s) Certificate of Conference added on 3/4/2008 (mpv, ). Modified on 3/4/2008 (mpv, ).
February 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER denying #15 Motion for Enlargement of Time to answer. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 2/25/08. (ch, )
February 22, 2008 Filing 159 RESPONSE to #156 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by International Printer Corporation. (Armon, Orion)
February 15, 2008 Filing 158 SEALED PATENT ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #157 MOTION to Dismiss Panasonic Corp. of North America's Counterclaims Against MWA Intelligence, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Orion Armon)(Armon, Orion)
February 15, 2008 Filing 157 MOTION to Dismiss Panasonic Corp. of North America's Counterclaims Against MWA Intelligence, Inc. by MWA Intelligence, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Orion Armon in Support of MWA Intelligence, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss#2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Orion Armon#3 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Orion Armon#4 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of Orion Armon#5 Text of Proposed Order)(Armon, Orion)
February 14, 2008 Filing 156 Second Amended ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against International Printer Corporation by Panasonic Corporation of North America.(Smith, Michael)
February 6, 2008 Filing 155 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by George Edmond Chandler on behalf of Acacia Research Corporation, Acacia Patent Acquisition Corporation (Chandler, George)
February 6, 2008 Filing 154 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by George Edmond Chandler on behalf of MWA Intelligence, Inc. (Chandler, George)
February 6, 2008 Filing 153 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by George Edmond Chandler on behalf of The Weinberger Group LLC (Chandler, George)
February 6, 2008 Filing 152 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas J Friel, Jr on behalf of The Weinberger Group LLC (Friel, Thomas)
February 6, 2008 Filing 151 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sarah JoAnn Guske on behalf of The Weinberger Group LLC (Guske, Sarah)
February 6, 2008 Filing 150 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Wayne Odis Stacy on behalf of The Weinberger Group LLC (Stacy, Wayne)
February 6, 2008 Filing 149 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James Patrick Brogan on behalf of The Weinberger Group LLC (Brogan, James)
February 6, 2008 Filing 148 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Orion Armon on behalf of The Weinberger Group LLC (Armon, Orion)
January 30, 2008 Filing 147 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Tammy M Pennington on behalf of Toshiba America Business Solutions, Inc., Toshiba Corporation (Pennington, Tammy)
January 29, 2008 Filing 146 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas J Friel, Jr on behalf of MWA Intelligence, Inc. (Friel, Thomas)
January 29, 2008 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for MWA Intelligence, Inc. to 2/27/2008.( mpv, )
January 28, 2008 Filing 145 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by George Edmond Chandler on behalf of MWA Intelligence, Inc. (Chandler, George)
January 28, 2008 Filing 144 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sarah JoAnn Guske on behalf of MWA Intelligence, Inc. (Guske, Sarah)
January 28, 2008 Filing 143 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Wayne Odis Stacy on behalf of MWA Intelligence, Inc. (Stacy, Wayne)
January 28, 2008 Filing 142 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James Patrick Brogan on behalf of MWA Intelligence, Inc. (Brogan, James)
January 28, 2008 Filing 141 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Orion Armon on behalf of MWA Intelligence, Inc. (Armon, Orion)
January 28, 2008 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re MWA Intelligence, Inc..( Armon, Orion)
January 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER granting #138 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Carl R Roth of The Roth Law Firm, P.C.. Added attorney Michael Charles Smith for Panasonic Corporation of North America.. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 1/24/08. (ehs, )
January 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER granting #137 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Carl R Roth of The Roth Law Firm withdrawn as cnsl for Panasonic Corporation of North America. Added attorney Michael Charles Smith for Panasonic Corporation of North America. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 1/23/08. (ehs, )
January 23, 2008 Filing 138 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Toshiba America Business Solutions, Inc., Toshiba Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Roth, Carl)
January 23, 2008 Filing 137 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Panasonic Corporation of North America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Roth, Carl)
January 14, 2008 Filing 136 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Dariush G Adli for Murata Machinery, LTD and Epson America, Inc. Seiko Epson, Muratec America. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID)2-1-3398 (ch, )
January 11, 2008 Filing 135 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Richard de Bodo for Murata Machinery, LTD and Epson America, Inc. Muratec America, Seiko Epson. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 2-1-3388 (ch, ) Modified on 5/12/2008 (ch, ).
December 21, 2007 Filing 134 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #81 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by International Printer Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Second Declaration of Orion Armon#2 Exhibit 1 to Armon Second Declaration#3 Exhibit 2 to Armon Second Declaration#4 Exhibit 3 to Armon Second Declaration#5 Exhibit 4 to Armon Second Declaration#6 Exhibit 5 to Armon Second Declaration#7 Exhibit 6 to Armon Second Declaration)(Armon, Orion)
December 14, 2007 Filing 133 ANSWER to Counterclaim of Seiko Epson Corporation by International Printer Corporation.(Armon, Orion)
December 14, 2007 Filing 132 ANSWER to Counterclaim of Muratec America, Inc. by International Printer Corporation.(Armon, Orion)
December 14, 2007 Filing 131 ANSWER to Counterclaim of Hewlett-Packard Company by International Printer Corporation.(Armon, Orion)
December 14, 2007 Filing 130 ANSWER to Counterclaim of Panasonic Corporation of North America by International Printer Corporation.(Armon, Orion)
December 14, 2007 Filing 129 ANSWER to Counterclaim of Oce North America, Inc. by International Printer Corporation.(Armon, Orion)
December 14, 2007 Filing 128 ANSWER to Counterclaim of Murata Machinery, Ltd. by International Printer Corporation.(Armon, Orion)
December 14, 2007 Filing 127 ANSWER to Counterclaim of Epson America, Inc. by International Printer Corporation.(Armon, Orion)
December 14, 2007 Filing 126 ANSWER to Counterclaim of Dell, Inc. by International Printer Corporation.(Armon, Orion)
December 14, 2007 Filing 125 ANSWER to Counterclaim of Eastman Kodak Company by International Printer Corporation.(Armon, Orion)
December 14, 2007 Filing 124 ANSWER to Counterclaim of Samsung Electronics America, Inc. by International Printer Corporation.(Armon, Orion)
December 14, 2007 Filing 123 ANSWER to Counterclaim of Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. by International Printer Corporation.(Armon, Orion)
December 14, 2007 Filing 122 ANSWER to Counterclaim of Toshiba America Business Solutions, Inc. by International Printer Corporation.(Armon, Orion)
December 14, 2007 Filing 121 ANSWER to Counterclaim of Xerox Corporation by International Printer Corporation.(Armon, Orion)
December 14, 2007 Filing 120 REPLY to Response to Motion re #81 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Oce N.V.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Loenen#2 Affidavit of Colen)(Siebman, Clyde)
December 12, 2007 Filing 119 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Hewlett-Packard Co. identifying None as Corporate Parent. (Ainsworth, Charles)
December 6, 2007 Filing 118 RESPONSE in Opposition re #81 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by International Printer Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Orion Armon in Support of International Printer Corp.'s Opposition to Oce N.V.'s Motion to Dismiss#2 Exhibit 1#3 Exhibit 2#4 Exhibit 3#5 Exhibit 4 - part 1#6 Exhibit 4 - part 2#7 Exhibit 5#8 Exhibit 6#9 Exhibit 7#10 Exhibit 8#11 Exhibit 9#12 Exhibit 10#13 Exhibit 11#14 Exhibit 12#15 Exhibit 13#16 Exhibit 14#17 Exhibit 15#18 Exhibit 16#19 Exhibit 17#20 Text of Proposed Order)(Armon, Orion)
December 6, 2007 Filing 117 First Amended ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against International Printer Corporation by Panasonic Corporation of North America.(Smith, Michael)
December 4, 2007 Filing 116 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew P Gubiotti on behalf of International Printer Corporation (Gubiotti, Matthew)
November 30, 2007 Filing 115 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Brother Industries, LTD. identifying NONE as Corporate Parent. (Abernathy, Nancy)
November 30, 2007 Filing 114 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Brother International Corporation identifying Brother Industries, Ltd. as Corporate Parent. (Abernathy, Nancy)
November 27, 2007 Filing 112 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by OKI Data Corporation identifying Oki Electric Industry Co., Ltd. as Corporate Parent. (Young, Damon)
November 27, 2007 Filing 111 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Oki Data Americas, Inc. identifying Oki Data Corp. as Corporate Parent. (Young, Damon)
November 26, 2007 Filing 113 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Neil F Greenblum for Panasonic Corporation of North America and Matsushita Electric Industrial Co. LTD. (APPR0VED)(FEE PAID) 2-1-3269 (ch, )
November 26, 2007 Filing 110 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Matsushita Electric Industrial Co. LTD identifying n/a as Corporate Parent. (Smith, Michael)
November 26, 2007 Filing 109 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Panasonic Corporation of North America identifying Matsushita Electric Industrial Co. Ltd as Corporate Parent. (Smith, Michael)
November 26, 2007 Filing 108 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Oce North America, Inc. identifying none as Corporate Parent. (Siebman, Clyde)
November 26, 2007 Filing 107 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Oce N.V. identifying none as Corporate Parent. (Siebman, Clyde)
November 21, 2007 Filing 106 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Toshiba America Business Solutions, Inc. (Partridge, Scott)
November 21, 2007 Filing 105 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and, COUNTERCLAIM against International Printer Corporation by Toshiba America Business Solutions, Inc..(Partridge, Scott)
November 21, 2007 Filing 104 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Toshiba Corporation (Partridge, Scott)
November 21, 2007 Filing 103 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Toshiba Corporation.(Partridge, Scott)
November 21, 2007 Filing 102 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Dell Inc. identifying None as Corporate Parent. (Prol, Howard)
November 21, 2007 Filing 101 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against International Printer Corporation by Dell Inc..(Prol, Howard)
November 21, 2007 Filing 100 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against International Printer Corporation by Oce North America, Inc..(Siebman, Clyde)
November 21, 2007 Filing 99 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc. identifying Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. as Corporate Parent. (Jones, Michael)
November 21, 2007 Filing 98 ANSWER to Complaint and, COUNTERCLAIM against International Printer Corporation by Samsung Electronics America, Inc..(Jones, Michael)
November 21, 2007 Filing 97 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Samsung Electronics Co., LTD., identifying None as Corporate Parent. (Jones, Michael)
November 21, 2007 Filing 96 ANSWER to Complaint and, COUNTERCLAIM against International Printer Corporation by Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,.(Jones, Michael)
November 21, 2007 Filing 95 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Eastman Kodak Company identifying None as Corporate Parent. (Hill, Jack)
November 21, 2007 Filing 94 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against International Printer Corporation by Eastman Kodak Company.(Hill, Jack)
November 21, 2007 Filing 93 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by OKI Data Corporation.(Young, Damon)
November 21, 2007 Filing 92 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Oki Data Americas, Inc..(Young, Damon)
November 21, 2007 Filing 91 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Murata Machinery, LTD identifying Murata Machinery, Ltd. as Corporate Parent. (Smith, Melissa)
November 21, 2007 Filing 90 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Muratec America, Inc. identifying Murata Machinery Ltd as Corporate Parent. (Smith, Melissa)
November 21, 2007 Filing 89 Defendant Muratec America, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint and, COUNTERCLAIM For Patent Infringement against International Printer Corporation by Muratec America, Inc..(Smith, Melissa)
November 21, 2007 Filing 88 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Xerox Corporation identifying None as Corporate Parent. (Bunt, Robert)
November 21, 2007 Filing 87 Defendant Murata Machinery LTD's ANSWER to Complaint and, COUNTERCLAIM For Patent Infringement against International Printer Corporation by Murata Machinery, LTD.(Smith, Melissa)
November 21, 2007 Filing 86 Xerox Corporation's ANSWER to Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against International Printer Corporation by Xerox Corporation.(Bunt, Robert)
November 21, 2007 Filing 85 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Epson America, Inc. identifying None as Corporate Parent. (Henson, Walter)
November 21, 2007 Filing 84 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Matsushita Electric Industrial Co. LTD.(Smith, Michael)
November 21, 2007 Filing 83 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against International Printer Corporation by Panasonic Corporation of North America.(Smith, Michael)
November 21, 2007 Filing 82 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Seiko Epson Corporation identifying None as Corporate Parent. (Henson, Walter)
November 21, 2007 Filing 81 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Memorandum in Support of Motion by Oce N.V.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order #2 Affidavit of Ron van Loenen)(Siebman, Clyde)
November 21, 2007 Filing 80 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and, COUNTERCLAIM against International Printer Corporation by Epson America, Inc..(Henson, Walter)
November 21, 2007 Filing 79 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Danny Lloyd Williams on behalf of Hewlett-Packard Co. (Williams, Danny)
November 21, 2007 Filing 78 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and, COUNTERCLAIM against International Printer Corporation by Seiko Epson Corporation.(Henson, Walter)
November 21, 2007 Filing 77 Hewlett-Packard Company's ANSWER to Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against International Printer Corporation by Hewlett-Packard Co..(Rambo, Rick)
November 21, 2007 Filing 76 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand Brother Industries, Ltd.'s Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint for Patent Infringement and Demand for Jury Trial by Brother Industries, LTD..(Abernathy, Nancy)
November 21, 2007 Filing 75 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand Brother International Corp.'s Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint for Patent Infringement and Demand for Jury Trial by Brother International Corporation.(Abernathy, Nancy)
November 14, 2007 Filing 74 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sidney Calvin Capshaw, III on behalf of Brother International Corporation, Brother Industries, LTD. (Capshaw, Sidney)
November 14, 2007 Filing 73 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nancy Claire Abernathy on behalf of Brother International Corporation, Brother Industries, LTD. (Abernathy, Nancy)
November 9, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER granting #71 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Dfts Brother International Corp and Brother Industries, Ltd, Dell, Inc. Eastman Kodak Company, Murata Machinery, Ltd Muratec America, Inc., and Seiko Epson Corp., Hewlett-Packard Company, Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd. Panasonic Corp of North America, Samsungt Electronics America, Inc. and Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. Oce' North America, Inc. and Oce' NV., Oki Corporation, Xerox Corporation deadline is extended to 11/21/07. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 11/9/07. (ch, )
November 9, 2007 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Murata Machinery, LTD to 11/21/2007; Oce North America, Inc. to 11/21/2007; Oce N.V. to 11/21/2007; Oki Data Americas, Inc. to 11/21/2007; OKI Data Corporation to 11/21/2007; Panasonic Corporation of North America to 11/21/2007; Matsushita Electric Industrial Co. LTD to 11/21/2007; Epson America, Inc. to 11/21/2007; Seiko Epson Corporation to 11/21/2007; Toshiba America Business Solutions, Inc. to 11/21/2007; Toshiba Corporation to 11/21/2007; Xerox Corporation to 11/21/2007; Eastman Kodak Company to 11/21/2007; Hewlett-Packard Co. to 11/21/2007; Muratec America, Inc. to 11/21/2007. (ch, )
November 8, 2007 Filing 71 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time on behalf of Defendants by Panasonic Corporation of North America, Toshiba America Business Solutions, Inc., Toshiba Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Joint Stipulation#2 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Michael)
October 31, 2007 Filing 70 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Stephen M Hankins for Eastman Kodak Company. APPROVED (FEE PAID)6-1-11599 (poa, )
October 31, 2007 Filing 69 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney William Paul Schuck for Eastman Kodak Company.APPROVED (FEE PAID) 6-1-11599 (poa, )
October 29, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER granting #20 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Deadlines are extended to 11/15/07 . Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 10/29/07. (ch, )
October 29, 2007 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Brother International Corporation to 11/15/2007; Brother Industries, LTD. to 11/15/2007. (ch, )
October 22, 2007 Filing 67 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney P Branko Pejic for Panasonic Corporation of North America. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 2-1-3144 (ch, )
October 18, 2007 Filing 66 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Kristiana M Brugger for Brother International Corporation and Brother Industries, LTD. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 2-1-3134. (ch, )
October 18, 2007 Filing 65 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney David M Schlitz for Brother International Corporation and Brother Industries, LTD. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 2-1-3133. (ch, )
October 11, 2007 Filing 64 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Ki Kim for Samsung Electronics America, Inc. and Samsung Electronics Co., LTD. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 6-1-11349. (ch, )
October 11, 2007 Filing 63 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Nickolas Bohl for Samsung Electronics America, Inc. and Samsung Electronics Co., LTD. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 6-1-11349. (ch, )
October 11, 2007 Filing 62 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Aaron Wainscoat for Samsung Electronics America, Inc. and Samsung Electronics Co., LTD. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 6-1-11349. (ch, )
October 11, 2007 Filing 61 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Mark D Fowler for Samsung Electronics America, Inc. and Samsung Electronics Co., LTD. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 6-1-11349. (ch, )
October 11, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER granting #58 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Deadline for Eastman Kodak extended to 11/8/07 . Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 10/11/07. (ehs, )
October 11, 2007 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Eastman Kodak Company to 11/8/2007. (ehs, )
October 5, 2007 Filing 59 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Michael J Fink for Panasonic Corporation of North America. (FEE PAID) 2-1-3093(ehs, )
October 5, 2007 Filing 58 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Original Complaint by Eastman Kodak Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order to Extend Time)(Hill, Jack)
September 25, 2007 Filing 57 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by International Printer Corporation. Eastman Kodak Company served on 9/18/2007, answer due 10/9/2007. (ehs, )
September 25, 2007 Filing 56 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Howard Kenneth Prol on behalf of Dell Inc. (Prol, Howard)
September 21, 2007 Filing 55 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Monica Lateef for Xerox Corporation.(APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 2-1-3021 (ch, )
September 21, 2007 Filing 54 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Jennifer L Dzwonczyk for Xerox Corporation. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 2-1-3021 (ch, )
September 21, 2007 Filing 53 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Joseph P Lavelle for Xerox Corporation. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 2-1-3021 (ch, )
September 19, 2007 Filing 52 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew S Wermager on behalf of Dell Inc. (Wermager, Matthew)
September 19, 2007 Filing 51 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian K Buss on behalf of Dell Inc. (Buss, Brian)
September 19, 2007 Filing 50 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Roderick B Williams on behalf of Dell Inc. (Williams, Roderick)
September 19, 2007 Filing 49 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney K Chris Todd (RECEIPT 5-1-1107) for Oki Data Americas, Inc. and OKI Data Corporation, John Christopher Rozendaal for Oki Data Americas, Inc. and OKI Data Corporation, Kenneth M Fetterman for Oki Data Americas, Inc. and OKI Data Corporation, Mark C Hansen for Oki Data Americas, Inc. and OKI Data Corporation, Michael E Joffre for Oki Data Americas, Inc. and OKI Data Corporation, Richard Stern for Oki Data Americas, Inc. and OKI Data Corporation. (Attachments: #1 PHV John C Rozendaal RECEIPT 5-1-1108#2 PHV Kenneth Fetterman RECEIPT 5-1-1109#3 PHV Mark C Hansen RECEIPT 5-1-1110#4 PHV Michael Joffre RECEIPT 5-1-1111#5 PHV Richard Stern RECEIPT 5-1-1112)(rml, )
September 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Murata Machinery Ltd. deadline is 11/12/07 . Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 9/18/07. (ch, )
September 19, 2007 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Murata Machinery, LTD to 11/12/2007. (ch, )
September 18, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Seiko Epson Corp deadline to answer is 11/15/07 . Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 9/18/07. (ch, )
September 18, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting #37 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Oki Data America's Inc and Oki Data Corps deadline to answer is extended to 11/12/07. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 9/18/07. (ch, )
September 18, 2007 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Seiko Epson Corporation to 11/15/2007. (ch, )
September 18, 2007 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Oki Data Americas, Inc. to 11/12/2007; OKI Data Corporation to 11/12/2007. (ch, )
September 17, 2007 Filing 45 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Ryan L Willis for Oki Data Americas, Inc. and OKI Data Corporation.(APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 2-1-3001 (ch, )
September 17, 2007 Filing 44 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney David A Mancino for Oki Data Americas, Inc. and OKI Data Corporation. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 2-1-3001 (ch, )
September 17, 2007 Filing 43 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Kevin W Kirsch for Oki Data Americas, Inc. and OKI Data Corporation. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 2-1-3001 (ch, )
September 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting #29 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Oce North America, Inc. and Oce N.V.'s deadlines are extended to 11/15/07 . Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 9/14/07. (ch, )
September 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting #30 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Toshiba Corp. and Toshiba America Business Solutions, Inc. deadline extended to 11/12/07. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 9/14/07. (ch, )
September 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting #31 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Samsung Electronics America, Inc. and Samsung Electronic Co Ltd. deadline is extended to 11/21/07 . Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 9/14/07. (ch, )
September 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting #33 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Dell, Inc. deadline is extended to 11/15/07 . Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 9/14/07. (ch, )
September 17, 2007 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Dell Inc. to 11/15/2007. (ch, )
September 17, 2007 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Toshiba America Business Solutions, Inc. to 11/12/2007; Toshiba Corporation to 11/12/2007. (ch, )
September 17, 2007 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Samsung Electronics America, Inc. to 11/21/2007; Samsung Electronics Co., LTD., to 11/21/2007. (ch, )
September 17, 2007 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Oce North America, Inc. to 11/15/2007; Oce N.V. to 11/15/2007. (ch, )
September 14, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting #35 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. International Printer Corp., Panasonic Corp. of North America and Matsushita Electric Industrial Co, Ltd deadline is extended to 11/12/07 . Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 9/14/07. (ch, )
September 14, 2007 Filing 37 Amended MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Oki Data Americas, Inc., OKI Data Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Young, Damon)
September 14, 2007 Filing 36 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Barry J Coyne for Oce North America, Inc. and Oce N.V., Frederick H Colen for Oce North America, Inc. and Oce N.V.. (APPROVED) (FEE PAID) 2-1-2999 (ch, )
September 14, 2007 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Panasonic Corporation of North America to 11/12/2007; Matsushita Electric Industrial Co. LTD to 11/12/2007; International Printer Corporation to 11/12/2007. (ch, )
September 13, 2007 Filing 35 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Panasonic Corp. of North America and Matsushita Electric Industrial Co. Ltd., by International Printer Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Armon, Orion)
September 13, 2007 Filing 34 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Clyde Moody Siebman on behalf of Oce North America, Inc., Oce N.V. (Siebman, Clyde)
September 13, 2007 Filing 33 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Dell Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Buss, Brian)
September 13, 2007 Filing 32 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by George Edmond Chandler on behalf of International Printer Corporation (Chandler, George)
September 12, 2007 Filing 31 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, [unopposed] by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
September 12, 2007 Filing 30 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint - Unopposed by Toshiba America Business Solutions, Inc., Toshiba Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Partridge, Scott)
September 12, 2007 Filing 29 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, and Waiver of Service of Process by OCE N.V., by International Printer Corporation. (Attachments: #1Proposed Order)(Armon, Orion) Modified on 9/12/2007 (mpv, ).
September 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #26 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Hewlett Packard Company's deadline is extended to 11/12/07 . Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 9/12/07. (ch, )
September 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #25 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Xerox Corporations deadline is extended to 11/16/07 . Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 9/12/07. (ch, )
September 12, 2007 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Xerox Corporation to 11/16/2007. (ch, )
September 12, 2007 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Hewlett-Packard Co. to 11/12/2007. (ch, )
September 11, 2007 Filing 26 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Hewlett-Packard Co.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Charles)
September 11, 2007 Filing 25 ***REPLACES DOCUMENT #24 *** MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, Unopposed Motion by Xerox Corporation to Extend TIme to Move, Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint for Patent Infringement by Xerox Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bunt, Robert) Modified on 9/11/2007 (ch, ).
September 11, 2007 Filing 24 ***FILED IN ERROR. SEE CORRECT DOCUMENT #25 *** MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, Unoppoed Motion by Xerox Corporation to Extend Time to Move, Answer, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint for Patent Infringement by Xerox Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bunt, Robert) Modified on 9/11/2007 (ch, ).
September 11, 2007 Filing 23 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James Patrick Brogan on behalf of International Printer Corporation (Brogan, James)
September 11, 2007 Filing 22 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sarah JoAnn Guske on behalf of International Printer Corporation (Guske, Sarah)
September 11, 2007 Filing 21 RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, filed by International Printer Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Armon, Orion)
September 11, 2007 ***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 24, Motion for extension of time. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
September 10, 2007 Filing 20 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, and Waiver of Service of Process by Brother Industries, Ltd., by International Printer Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Armon, Orion) Additional attachment(s)(Revised Order) added on 9/17/2007 (ch, ). Modified on 9/17/2007 (ch, ).
September 10, 2007 Filing 19 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, and Waiver of Service of Process by Murata Machinery, Ltd., by International Printer Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Armon, Orion) Additional attachment(s)(Revised Order) added on 9/17/2007 (ch, ). Modified on 9/17/2007 (ch, ).
September 10, 2007 Filing 18 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, and Waiver of Service of Process by Seiko Epson Corp., by International Printer Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Armon, Orion) Additional attachment(s)(Revised order) added on 9/17/2007 (ch, ). Modified on 9/17/2007 (ch, ).
September 10, 2007 Filing 17 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas J Friel, Jr on behalf of International Printer Corporation (Friel, Thomas)
September 10, 2007 Filing 16 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Orion Armon on behalf of International Printer Corporation (Armon, Orion)
September 10, 2007 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Oki Data Americas, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Young, Damon)
September 7, 2007 Filing 14 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by International Printer Corporation. Epson America, Inc. served Process Server on 8/27/2007, answer due 9/17/2007. (ch, )
September 7, 2007 Filing 13 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by International Printer Corporation. Dell Inc. served Process Server on 8/27/2007, answer due 9/17/2007. (ch, )
September 7, 2007 Filing 12 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by International Printer Corporation. Brother International Corporation served Process Server on 8/27/2007, answer due 9/17/2007. (ch, )
September 7, 2007 Filing 11 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by International Printer Corporation. Xerox Corporation served Process Server on 8/27/2007, answer due 9/17/2007. (ch, )
September 7, 2007 Filing 10 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by International Printer Corporation. Oki Data Americas, Inc. served Process Server on 8/24/2007, answer due 9/13/2007. (ch, )
September 5, 2007 Filing 9 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by International Printer Corporation. Hewlett-Packard Co. served by Process Server on 8/24/2007, answer due 9/13/2007. (ch, )
September 5, 2007 Filing 8 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by International Printer Corporation. Muratec America, Inc. served by Process Server on 8/24/2007, answer due 9/13/2007. (ch, )
September 5, 2007 Filing 7 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by International Printer Corporation. Toshiba America Business Solutions, Inc. served by Process Server on 8/24/2007, answer due 9/13/2007. (ch, )
September 5, 2007 Filing 6 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by International Printer Corporation. Oce North America, Inc. served by Process Server on 8/24/2007, answer due 9/13/2007. (ch, )
September 5, 2007 Filing 5 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by International Printer Corporation. Panasonic Corporation of North America served by Process Server on 8/24/2007, answer due 9/13/2007. (ch, )
September 5, 2007 Filing 4 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by International Printer Corporation. Samsung Electronics America, Inc. served by Process Server on 8/24/2007, answer due 9/13/2007. (ch, )
August 22, 2007 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Murata Machinery, LTD, Oce North America, Inc., Oce N.V., Oki Data Americas, Inc., OKI Data Corporation, Panasonic Corporation of North America, Matsushita Electric Industrial Co. LTD, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Epson America, Inc., Seiko Epson Corporation, Toshiba America Business Solutions, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, Xerox Corporation, Brother International Corporation, Brother Industries, LTD., Dell Inc., Eastman Kodak Company, Hewlett-Packard Co., Muratec America, Inc.. (ehs, )
August 21, 2007 Filing 3 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Defendants List#2 Exhibit Patent List)(Stacy, Wayne)
August 21, 2007 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by International Printer Corporation identifying Acacia Patent Acquisition Corp. as Corporate Parent. (Stacy, Wayne)
August 21, 2007 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Patent Infringement against all defendants ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 1236408.), filed by International Printer Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C#4 Exhibit D#5 Exhibit E#6 Exhibit F)(Stacy, Wayne) Civil Cover Sheet added on 8/22/2007 (mpv, ). Modified on 8/22/2007 (mpv, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: International Printer Corp v. Brother International Corp et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hewlett-Packard Co.
Represented By: Rick L. Rambo
Represented By: Danny Lloyd Williams
Represented By: Charles Ainsworth
Represented By: James A Jorgensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Muratec America, Inc.
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Represented By: Robert R Bodoin
Represented By: Dariush Ghaffar Adli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xerox Corporation
Represented By: Jennifer L Dzwonczyk
Represented By: Robert Christopher Bunt
Represented By: Joseph P Lavelle
Represented By: Monica Lateef
Represented By: Jim W Ko
Represented By: Kevin Alan Mittler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oce N.V.
Represented By: Barry J Coyne
Represented By: Frederick H Colen
Represented By: Clyde Moody Siebman
Represented By: Lawrence Augustine Phillips
Represented By: Joshua S Bish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brother International Corporation
Represented By: David M Schlitz
Represented By: Sidney Calvin Capshaw, III
Represented By: Claire Abernathy Henry
Represented By: Kurt Max Pankratz
Represented By: Kristiana M Brugger
Represented By: Jedidiah Jarrett Rollins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,
Represented By: Aaron Wainscoat
Represented By: John M Guaragna
Represented By: Ki Kim
Represented By: Mark D Fowler
Represented By: Nickolas Bohl
Represented By: Douglas Ray McSwane, Jr
Represented By: Michael E Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Panasonic Corporation of North America
Represented By: Michael Charles Smith
Represented By: Michael J Fink
Represented By: P Branko Pejic
Represented By: Neil F Greenblum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Murata Machinery, LTD
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Represented By: Robert R Bodoin
Represented By: Dariush Ghaffar Adli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matsushita Electric Industrial Co. LTD
Represented By: Michael Charles Smith
Represented By: Neil F Greenblum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Epson America, Inc.
Represented By: Robert R Bodoin
Represented By: Dariush Ghaffar Adli
Represented By: Walter Thomas Henson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OKI Data Corporation
Represented By: Damon Michael Young
Represented By: Kenneth M Fetterman
Represented By: Ryan L Willis
Represented By: John Michael Pickett
Represented By: Richard Stern
Represented By: David A Mancino
Represented By: Kevin Walpole Kirsch
Represented By: Michael E Joffre
Represented By: K Chris Todd
Represented By: Mark Hansen
Represented By: John Christopher Rozendaal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toshiba Corporation
Represented By: Michael Charles Smith
Represented By: Scott F Partridge
Represented By: Tammy M Pennington Rhodes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toshiba America Business Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Charles Smith
Represented By: Scott F Partridge
Represented By: Tammy M Pennington Rhodes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eastman Kodak Company
Represented By: William Paul Schuck
Represented By: Stephen M Hankins
Represented By: Jack Wesley Hill
Represented By: Otis W Carroll, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Electronics America, Inc.
Represented By: Aaron Wainscoat
Represented By: John M Guaragna
Represented By: Ki Kim
Represented By: Mark D Fowler
Represented By: Nickolas Bohl
Represented By: Douglas Ray McSwane, Jr
Represented By: Michael E Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oki Data Americas, Inc.
Represented By: Damon Michael Young
Represented By: Kenneth M Fetterman
Represented By: Ryan L Willis
Represented By: John Michael Pickett
Represented By: Richard Stern
Represented By: David A Mancino
Represented By: Kevin Walpole Kirsch
Represented By: Michael E Joffre
Represented By: K Chris Todd
Represented By: Mark Hansen
Represented By: John Christopher Rozendaal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seiko Epson Corporation
Represented By: Robert R Bodoin
Represented By: Dariush Ghaffar Adli
Represented By: Walter Thomas Henson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dell Inc. doing business as Dell Computer Inc.
Represented By: Howard Kenneth Prol
Represented By: Roderick B Williams
Represented By: Eugene Andrew Feher
Represented By: Brian K Buss
Represented By: James C Hall
Represented By: Matthew S Wermager
Represented By: Paul J Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oce North America, Inc.
Represented By: Barry J Coyne
Represented By: Frederick H Colen
Represented By: Clyde Moody Siebman
Represented By: Lawrence Augustine Phillips
Represented By: Joshua S Bish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brother Industries, LTD.
Represented By: David M Schlitz
Represented By: Sidney Calvin Capshaw, III
Represented By: Claire Abernathy Henry
Represented By: Elizabeth L DeRieux
Represented By: Kurt Max Pankratz
Represented By: Kristiana M Brugger
Represented By: Jedidiah Jarrett Rollins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: MWA Intelligence, Inc.
Represented By: Sarah JoAnn Guske
Represented By: Orion Armon
Represented By: Thomas J Friel, Jr
Represented By: George Edmond Chandler
Represented By: James Patrick Brogan
Represented By: Wayne Odis Stacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: The Weinberger Group LLC
Represented By: Sarah JoAnn Guske
Represented By: Orion Armon
Represented By: Thomas J Friel, Jr
Represented By: George Edmond Chandler
Represented By: James Patrick Brogan
Represented By: Wayne Odis Stacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Acacia Patent Acquisition Corporation
Represented By: George Edmond Chandler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Acacia Research Corporation
Represented By: George Edmond Chandler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Printer Corporation
Represented By: Sarah JoAnn Guske
Represented By: Matthew Paul Gubiotti
Represented By: Orion Armon
Represented By: Thomas Milton Croft
Represented By: Eamonn Joseph Gardner
Represented By: Thomas J Friel, Jr
Represented By: George Edmond Chandler
Represented By: James Patrick Brogan
Represented By: Wayne Odis Stacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Dell Inc.
Represented By: Howard Kenneth Prol
Represented By: Roderick B Williams
Represented By: Eugene Andrew Feher
Represented By: Brian K Buss
Represented By: James C Hall
Represented By: Matthew S Wermager
Represented By: Paul J Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?