Polaris IP, LLC v. Google Inc. et al Featured Case

Polaris IP, LLC sued Google Inc., Yahoo! Inc., Amazon.com Inc., A9.com, Inc., Borders, Inc., Borders Group Inc., AOL LLC, America Online, Inc., IAC/InteractiveCorp., and IAC Search and Media, Inc. for patent infringement involving U.S. Patent No. 6,411,947 entitled "Automatic Message Interpretation and Routing System." Plaintiff alleges that defendants are infringing on the patent by implementing various websites that comprise interpreting electronic messages with rule base and case base knowledge engines.

Plaintiff: Polaris IP, LLC
Defendant: Google Inc., Yahoo!, Inc., AOL, LLC., America Online, Inc., IAC/Interactivecorp and IAC Search and Media, Inc.
Counter Defendant: Polaris IP, LLC
Counter Claimant: IAC/Interactivecorp and IAC Search and Media, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2007cv00371
Filed: August 27, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Marshall Office
County: Anderson
Presiding Judge: Charles Everingham
Presiding Judge: T. John Ward
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 669 ORDER granting 666 Motion to Redact re 640 Transcript,,, 646 Transcript,,, 642 Transcript,,, 639 Transcript,,, 637 Transcript,,, 647 Transcript,,, 645 Transcript,,, 644 Transcript,,, 648 Transcript,,, 649 Transcript,,,, 643 Transcript,,, 650 Transcript,,, 638 Transcript,,, 641 Transcript,,,. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 10/29/10. (ehs, )
October 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 668 ORDER granting 667 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Patrick Rolf Anderson terminated for Bright Response, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 10/12/10. (ehs, )
October 8, 2010 Filing 667 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Anderson, Patrick)
September 30, 2010 Filing 666 Unopposed MOTION to Redact 645 Transcript,,, 644 Transcript,,, 648 Transcript,,, 643 Transcript,,, 641 Transcript,,, by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
September 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 665 ORDER granting 664 Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion to Redact Trial Transcript. Defendant Google's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion to Redact Trial Transcript is hereby GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 9/24/10. (ehs, )
September 23, 2010 Filing 664 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion to Redact Trial Transcript by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
September 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 663 ORDER granting 662 Motion for Extension of Time to File for application for costs or fees. Deadline extended until 14 days after the Court lifts the stay of the remaining inequitable conduct cause of action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 9/13/10. (ehs, )
September 10, 2010 Filing 662 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File (Agreed Motion to Extend the Deadline for Application of Fees and Costs) by Bright Response LLC, Google Inc., Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer)
September 9, 2010 Filing 661 NOTICE by Google Inc. re 648 Transcript,,, Notice of Intent to Request Redaction (Perlson, David)
September 9, 2010 Filing 660 NOTICE by Google Inc. re 645 Transcript,,, Notice of Intent to Request Redaction (Perlson, David)
September 9, 2010 Filing 659 NOTICE by Google Inc. re 644 Transcript,,, Notice of Intent to Request Redaction (Perlson, David)
September 9, 2010 Filing 658 NOTICE by Google Inc. re 643 Transcript,,, Notice of Intent to Request Redaction (Perlson, David)
September 9, 2010 Filing 657 NOTICE by Google Inc. re 641 Transcript,,, Notice of Intent to Request Redaction (Perlson, David)
September 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 656 ORDER - In accordance with the courts ruling during the 9/3/2010 telephonic conference, the court STAYS and ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSES the remaining inequitable conduct cause of action, pending an en banc opinion from the Federal Circuit in Therasense Inc. v. Becton, Dickinson & Co. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 9/8/2010. (ch, )
September 7, 2010 Filing 655 NOTICE by Google Inc. Notice of Intent to Pursue Inequitable Conduct Counterclaims (Perlson, David)
September 7, 2010 Filing 654 NOTICE by Yahoo!, Inc. (Notice of Intent to Pursue Inequitable Conduct Counterclaims) (Doan, Jennifer)
September 3, 2010 Filing 653 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham: Telephonic Conference held on 9/3/2010. (Jan Lockhart, ECRO.) (jml)
September 1, 2010 Filing 652 NOTICE of Hearing: TELEPHONIC Hearing on Inequitable Conduct set for 9/3/2010, 10:00 AM, in Mag Ctrm (Marshall) before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham. (delat)
August 31, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 651 JOINT FINAL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 8/31/10. (ehs, )
August 30, 2010 Filing 650 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 8/9/10 Verdict before Judge T. John Ward. Court Reporter/Transcriber: S. Simmons/J. Werlinger,Telephone number: 903/935-3868. <P>NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov<P> Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 9/23/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/4/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/2/2010. (lss, )
August 30, 2010 Filing 649 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 8/7/10 Charge of Court and Closing Arguments before Judge Chad Everingham. Court Reporter/Transcriber: S. Simmons/J. Werlinger,Telephone number: 903/935-3868. <P>NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov<P> Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 9/23/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/4/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/2/2010. (lss, )
August 30, 2010 Filing 648 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 8/6/10 Afternoon Session before Judge Chad Everingham. Court Reporter/Transcriber: S. Simmons/J. Werlinger,Telephone number: 903/935-3868. <P>NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov<P> Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 9/23/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/4/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/2/2010. (lss, )
August 30, 2010 Filing 647 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 8/6/10 Morning Session before Judge Chad Everingham. Court Reporter/Transcriber: S. Simmons/J. Werlinger,Telephone number: 903/935-3868. <P>NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov<P> Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 9/23/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/4/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/2/2010. (lss, )
August 30, 2010 Filing 646 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 8/5/10 JMOLs before Judge Chad Everingham. Court Reporter/Transcriber: S. Simmons/J. Werlinger,Telephone number: 903/935-3868. <P>NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov<P> Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 9/23/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/4/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/2/2010. (lss, )
August 30, 2010 Filing 645 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 8/5/10 Afternoon Session before Judge Chad Everingham. Court Reporter/Transcriber: S. Simmons/J. Werlinger,Telephone number: 903/935-3868. <P>NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov<P> Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 9/23/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/4/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/2/2010. (lss, )
August 30, 2010 Filing 644 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 8/5/10 Morning Session before Judge Chad Everingham. Court Reporter/Transcriber: S. Simmons/J. Werlinger,Telephone number: 903/935-3868. <P>NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov<P> Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 9/23/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/4/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/2/2010. (lss, )
August 30, 2010 Filing 643 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 8/4/10 Afternoon Session before Judge Chad Everingham. Court Reporter/Transcriber: S. Simmons/J. Werlinger,Telephone number: 903/935-3868. <P>NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov<P> Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 9/23/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/4/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/2/2010. (lss, )
August 30, 2010 Filing 642 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 8/4/10 Morning Session before Judge Chad Everingham. Court Reporter/Transcriber: S. Simmons/J. Werlinger,Telephone number: 903/935-3868. <P>NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov<P> Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 9/23/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/4/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/2/2010. (lss, )
August 30, 2010 Filing 641 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 8/3/10 Afternoon Session before Judge Chad Everingham. Court Reporter/Transcriber: S. Simmons/J. Werlinger,Telephone number: 903/935-3868. <P>NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov<P> Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 9/23/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/4/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/2/2010. (lss, )
August 30, 2010 Filing 640 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 8/3/10 Morning Session before Judge Chad Everingham. Court Reporter/Transcriber: S. Simmons/J. Werlinger,Telephone number: 903/935-3868. <P>NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov<P> Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 9/23/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/4/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/2/2010. (lss, )
August 30, 2010 Filing 639 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 8/2/10 Afternoon Session before Judge Chad Everingham. Court Reporter/Transcriber: S. Simmons/J. Werlinger,Telephone number: 903/935-3868. <P>NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov<P> Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 9/23/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/4/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/2/2010. (lss, )
August 30, 2010 Filing 638 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 8/2/10 Objections to Exhibits before Judge Chad Everingham. Court Reporter/Transcriber: S. Simmons/ J. Werlinger,Telephone number: 903/935-3868. <P>NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov<P> Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 9/23/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/4/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/2/2010. (lss, )
August 30, 2010 Filing 637 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 8/2/10 Voir Dire before Judge Chad Everingham. Court Reporter/Transcriber: S. Simmons/J. Werlinger,Telephone number: 903/935-3868. <P>NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov<P> Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 9/23/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/4/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/2/2010. (lss, )
August 30, 2010 Filing 636 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 8/2/10 Hearing before Judge Chad Everingham. Court Reporter/Transcriber: S. Simmons/J. Werlinger,Telephone number: 903/935-3868. <P>NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov<P> Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 9/23/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/4/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/2/2010. (lss, )
August 30, 2010 Filing 635 Sealed Transcript. (lss, )
August 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 634 JUDGMENT - In accordance with the jurys verdict, it is ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that Googles AdWords system and Yahoos Sponsored Search system do not infringe claims 30, 31, or 33 of the 947 patent and that the 947 patent is invalid. Therefore, Bright Response takes nothing by way of its patent infringement claims, and those claims are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 8/27/2010. (ch, )
August 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 633 ORDER - Within ten days, the defendants Google, Inc. and Yahoo! Inc. shall file a notice that indicates whether they intend to pursue their inequitable conduct counterclaims against the plaintiff Bright Response, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 8/27/2010. (ch, )
August 11, 2010 Filing 631 NOTICE by Yahoo!, Inc. of Amended Trial Exhibit List (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Doan, Jennifer)
August 9, 2010 Filing 628 SEALED Jury Notes. (jml)
August 9, 2010 Filing 627 JURY VERDICT. (jml)
August 9, 2010 Filing 626 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge T. John Ward: Jury Trial Day Seven completed on 8/9/2010. (Court Reporter Susan Simmons, CSR.) (jml)
August 9, 2010 ***Document # 614, Motion. MODIFIED placing motion under seal per attorney.*** (ehs, )
August 9, 2010 Filing 619 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Infringement as to Defendant Yahoo Inc. by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wiley, Elizabeth)
August 9, 2010 Filing 618 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Infringement as to Defendant Google Inc. by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wiley, Elizabeth)
August 9, 2010 Filing 617 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law that the Rice Patent is not Invalid by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wiley, Elizabeth)
August 9, 2010 Filing 616 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Written Description and Inventorship by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wiley, Elizabeth)
August 7, 2010 Filing 632 Proposed Jury Instructions(by all parties) Refused by Court on 8-7-10. (jml)
August 7, 2010 Filing 630 Defendants', Google, Inc. and Yahoo, Inc., Final Exhibit List. (jml)
August 7, 2010 Filing 629 Plaintiff's Final Exhibit List. (jml)
August 7, 2010 Filing 625 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham: Jury Trial held on 8/7/2010. (Court Reporter Judy Werlinger, CSR.) (jml)
August 7, 2010 Filing 615 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Invalidity for Failure to Satisfy the Written Description Requirement of 35 USC Sec 112 Para 1 by Google Inc., Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 White Declaration, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B)(Doan, Jennifer)
August 7, 2010 Filing 614 SEALED MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law of Non-Infringement by Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer) Modified on 8/9/2010 placing motion under seal per attorney (ehs, ).
August 7, 2010 Filing 613 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Damages by Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer)
August 7, 2010 Filing 612 NOTICE by Yahoo!, Inc. re 610 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Invalidity (Notice of Joinder in Google's Motion For Judgment as a Matter of Law on Invalidity) (Doan, Jennifer)
August 7, 2010 Filing 611 SEALED MOTION for Jugment as a Matter of Law on Non-Infringement by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
August 7, 2010 Filing 610 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Invalidity by Google Inc.. Responses due by 8/23/2010 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Kevin)
August 6, 2010 Filing 624 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham: Jury Trial held on 8/6/2010. (Court Reporter Judy Werlinger, CSR.) (jml)
August 6, 2010 Filing 609 SEALED MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law of No Damages by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Kevin)
August 6, 2010 Filing 608 NOTICE by Bright Response LLC of Response to Court's Inquiry Re Inequitable Conduct (Anderson, Patrick)
August 5, 2010 Filing 623 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham: Jury Trial Day Four held on 8/5/2010. (Court Reporter Judy Werlinger, CSR.) (jml)
August 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 607 ORDER withdrawing 572 Sealed Motion for Reconsideratuon of Docket # 566; granting 581 Motion to Withdraw. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 8/5/2010. (ch, )
August 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 606 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 492 Sealed Motion to Preclude Testimony by Dr Edward A Fox. The court grants the request to preclude Dr. Fox from offering an opinion on the 947 patents validity. Dr. Fox may testify that the patent uses e-mail and non- trivial, typically multiword texts as examples of electronic messages, so long as he recognizes that the term is not limited to those examples. The balance of the plaintiffs motion is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 8/5/2010. (ch, )
August 4, 2010 Filing 622 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham: Jury Trial Day Three held on 8/4/2010. (Court Reporter Judy Werlinger, CSR.) (jml)
August 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 605 ORDER - Supplement to Court's June 18, 2010 Markman opinion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on August 4, 2010. (jml)
August 4, 2010 Filing 604 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of PRE-TRIAL HEARING held on 7/28/10 before Judge Chad Everingham. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR,Telephone number: (903) 663-5082. (89 Pages)NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/30/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/10/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/5/2010. (tja, )
August 4, 2010 Filing 603 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 600 MOTION for Reconsideration re 588 Order,,,, Granting Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 10 (re: non-infringing alternatives) MOTION for Reconsideration re 588 Order,,,, Granting Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 10 (re: non-infringing alternatives), 601 Emergency MOTION for Reconsideration re 588 Order,,,, (Yahoo!'s Emergency Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's Ruling on Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 11)Emergency MOTION for Reconsideration re 588 Order,,,, (Yahoo!'s Emergency Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's Ruling on Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 11) filed by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Elizabeth Wiley, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2)(Wiley, Elizabeth)
August 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 621 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham: Jury Trial Day Two held on 8/3/2010. (Court Reporter Judy Werlinger, CSR.) (jml)
August 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 602 Additional Attachments to Main Document: 600 MOTION for Reconsideration re 588 Order,,,, Granting Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 10 (re: non-infringing alternatives).. (Perlson, David)
August 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 601 Emergency MOTION for Reconsideration re 588 Order,,,, (Yahoo!'s Emergency Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's Ruling on Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 11) by Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer)
August 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 600 MOTION for Reconsideration re 588 Order,,,, Granting Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 10 (re: non-infringing alternatives) by Google Inc.. (Perlson, David) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/3/2010: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (sm, ).
August 3, 2010 Opinion or Order NOTICE of DEFICIENCY regarding the #591 Dfts Joint Motion submitted by Google Inc., Yahoo!, Inc.. No certificate of conference included and plaintiff not included. Correction should be made by 1 business day and refiled. (sm, )
August 3, 2010 Opinion or Order ***FILED IN ERROR. Document # Order, 599 wrong style and case number. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ehs, )
August 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 599 ***FILED IN ERROR DOCKETED IN WRONG CASE***br>ORDER REGARDING EXHIBITS -. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 8/3/10. (ehs, ) Modified on 8/3/2010 (ehs, ). Modified on 8/3/2010 (ehs, ).
August 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 598 ORDER - The court overrules the objections to the deposition excerpts of Tak Yan, Erich Spangenberg, Jack Menzel, and Daniel Wright.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 8/3/10. (ehs, )
August 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 597 ORDER denying 526 Sealed Motion to exclude the opinions of Mary A Woodford regarding lump sum royalty. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 8/3/10. (ehs, )
August 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 596 ORDER denying 592 Sealed Motion to preclude Bradlee Sheafe. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 8/3/10. (ehs, )
August 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 595 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 485 Sealed Motion; granting in part and denying in part 505 Sealed Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 8/3/10. (ehs, )
August 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 594 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 525 Sealed Motion to Exclude the testimony and opinions of Dr V Thomas Rhyne. (see attached order). Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 8/3/10. (poa, )
August 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 593 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE granting 576 Motion to Dismiss. ORDER that all claims and counterclaims asserted in this suit between plaintiff and defendants America Online, Inc and AOL, LLC are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 8/3/10. (poa, )
August 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 592 Emergency SEALED MOTION TO PRECLUDE BRADLEE SHEAFE FROM OFFERING EXPERT TESTIMONY THAT 10% IS A REASONABLE ROYALTY by Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2)(Doan, Jennifer)
August 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 620 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham: Jury Trial held on 8/2/2010. (Court Reporter Judy Werlinger, CSR.) (jml)
August 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 591 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT, PLEASE IGNORE.***Joint MOTION Request for Relief (Jury Instruction) by Google Inc., Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David) Modified on 8/3/2010 (sm, ).
August 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 590 MOTION to Strike Google's Witnesses Whearley and Wagner Disclosed On August 1, 2010 by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wiley, Elizabeth)
August 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 589 Sealed Document. Notice of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Anderson Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A)(Anderson, Patrick)
August 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 588 ORDER - The court issues this supplemental order on motions in limine to address the motions that were carried in the courts previous order (Dkt. No. 571). Bright Response's Motions in Limine 6. GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The court will allow Dr. Branting to testify about the facts disclosed in his dissertation, but he may not go further as a fact witness than what is revealed in the document itself. 10. GRANTED. 11. GRANTED. 32. a. DENIED. b. DENIED. c. GRANTED. d. DENIED. 33. DENIED. Defendants Joint Motions in Limine 7. GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The court will allow evidence of lump sum licenses to the patent-in-suit entered in settlement in support of the defendants damages model.8. DENIED. This motion is denied as a motion in limine, but the court will not allow the plaintiff to offer evidence inconsistent with its 30(b)(6) witnesses testimony or its assertion of privilege. Yahoos Motions in Limine 3. DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 8/2/10. (ehs, )
August 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 587 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 575 Motion for Reconsideration or clarify the court's denial of the pltf's motion in limine no 14. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 8/2/10. (ehs, )
August 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 586 MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER granting in part and denying in part pltf's motion and denying deft's motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 8/2/10. (ehs, )
August 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 585 Additional Attachments to Main Document: 583 Response to Motion.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Wiley Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E)(Wiley, Elizabeth)
August 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 584 RESPONSE to Motion re 578 MOTION to Continue Trial and for Additional Time for Trial filed by Yahoo!, Inc.. (Doan, Jennifer)
August 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 583 RESPONSE to Motion re 578 MOTION to Continue Trial and for Additional Time for Trial filed by Bright Response LLC. (Wiley, Elizabeth)
August 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 582 SEALED MOTION EMERGENCY MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF DOCKET #566 by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Anderson Decl, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Anderson, Patrick)
August 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 581 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw 572 Emergency SEALED MOTION for Reconsideration of Docket #566 by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Anderson, Patrick)
August 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 580 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 572 Emergency SEALED MOTION for Reconsideration of Docket #566 filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Perlson, David)
August 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 579 SEALED MOTION to Confirm Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement as to AdMixer and to Preclude Evidence & Opinion of Infringement Under the Doctrine of Equivalents by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
August 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 578 MOTION to Continue Trial and for Additional Time for Trial by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of M. Kammerud, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
August 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 577 STIPULATION by AOL, LLC., America Online, Inc., Bright Response LLC, Google Inc., Yahoo!, Inc.. (Perlson, David)
August 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 576 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss America Online, Inc. and AOL, LLC with Prejudice by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Anderson, Patrick)
July 31, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 575 MOTION for Reconsideration OR TO CLARIFY THE COURTS RULING DENYING PLAINTIFFS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 14 (CLAIMS NO LONGER BEING PURSUED) IN LIGHT OF THE COURTS GRANTING MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 15 (PRODUCTS NO LONGER ACCUSED) by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 DECLARATION, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Wiley, Elizabeth)
July 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 574 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 536 SEALED MOTION Emergency Motion to Strike the Late Served Supplemental Expert Report of W. Christopher Bakewell, Google's Damages Expert filed by AOL, LLC., America Online, Inc., Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of M. Kammerud, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4)(Candido, Amy)
July 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 573 RESPONSE to Motion re 446 SEALED MOTION in Limine 9 (joint) (Supplemental Brief In Support Of Its Response) filed by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Wiley Decl, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C)(Wiley, Elizabeth)
July 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 572 ****WITHDRAWN PER ORDER # 607 ****Emergency SEALED MOTION for Reconsideration of Docket #566 by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Patrick Anderson, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Anderson, Patrick) Modified on 8/5/2010 (ch, ).
July 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 571 ORDER granting 439 Motion in Limine; granting 440 Sealed Motion; granting 441 Sealed Motion; granting 442 Motion in Limine; granting 443 Sealed Motion; granting 444 Motion in Limine; granting 446 Sealed Motion; granting 447 Motion in Limine; granting 448 Motion in Limine; granting 449 Sealed Motion; granting 450 Sealed Motion; granting 451 Sealed Motion; granting in part and denying in part and withdrawing 453 Sealed Motion; granting in part and denying in part 454 Sealed Motion; granting in part and denying in part 455 Sealed Motion; granting 457 Sealed Motion; granting in part and denying in part 460 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 462 Sealed Motion; granting in part and denying in part 464 Sealed Motion; granting in part and denying in part 476 Sealed Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/31/2010. (sm, )
July 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 570 ORDER granting 550 Motion for Leave to File A RESPONSE IN Excess Pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/30/2010. (sm, )
July 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: Final Pretrial Conference reset for 7/28/2010 01:30 PM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham. Jury Selection and Trial reset for 8/2/2010 in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham. (sm, )
July 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 569 ORDER granting 553 Motion to Amend/Correct Scheduling Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/30/2010. (sm, )
July 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 568 ORDER that court allows thirteen hours to each side to present its case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/30/2010. (sm, )
July 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 567 ORDER denying 394 SEALED Motion for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement by Yahoo! Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on July 30, 2010. (jml)
July 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 566 ORDER denying 388 Sealed Motion for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on July 30, 2010. (jml) Modified on 7/30/2010 (jml, ).
July 30, 2010 Opinion or Order ***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 562, Reply. PLEASE IGNORE. SEE DOCKET # 564 FOR CORRECTED ENTRY*** (ehs, )
July 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 565 Sealed Document - Notice regarding defendants deposition designations by Bright Response. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Wiley, Elizabeth) Modified on 7/30/2010 (sm, ).
July 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 564 ***REPLACES DOCUMENT # 562 WHICH WAS FILED IN ERROR***Corrected SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 485 SEALED MOTION (Yahoo!'s Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Plaintiff's Damages Expert Stephen Becker) SEALED MOTION (Yahoo!'s Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Plaintiff's Damages Expert Stephen Becker) filed by Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Josh Thane, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C)(Doan, Jennifer) Modified on 7/30/2010 (ehs, ).
July 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 563 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 525 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Testimony and Opinions of Dr. V. Thomas Rhyne filed by AOL, LLC., Google Inc., Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Perlson, David)
July 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 562 ***FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY. SEE CORRECTED DOCUMENT #[564***SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 485 SEALED MOTION (Yahoo!'s Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Plaintiff's Damages Expert Stephen Becker) SEALED MOTION (Yahoo!'s Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Plaintiff's Damages Expert Stephen Becker) filed by Yahoo!, Inc.. (Doan, Jennifer) Modified on 7/30/2010 (ehs, ).
July 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 561 SEALED SURREPLY in Opposition to Motion re 505 Google's SEALED MOTION to Exclude Certain Opinions of Plaintiff's Damages Expert Stephen L. Becker filed by Bright Response LLC. (Hoffman, Adam)
July 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 560 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 485 SEALED MOTION (Yahoo!'s Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Plaintiff's Damages Expert Stephen Becker) filed by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Adam Hoffman, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C)(Hoffman, Adam)
July 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 559 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 505 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Certain Opinions of Plantiff's Damages Expert Stephen L. Becker filed by AOL, LLC., Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Smith Reply Declaration, # 2 Exhibit L, # 3 Exhibit M)(Smith, Kevin)
July 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 556 ORDER granting 535 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Plaintiffs request for an increase of 5 pages is GRANTED.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/29/10. (ehs, )
July 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 555 ORDER granting 549 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Dkt. No. 485: Yahoo!'s Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Plaintiff's Damages Expert Stephen Becker. Plaintiff is permitted an extension of one day to respond to the above reference motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/29/10. (ehs, )
July 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 554 ORDER granting 473 Motion. Plaintiffs counsel Mr. David Pridham shall be allowed, immediately upon the issuance of this Order, access to all expert reports concerning damages, and any documents relied upon by the experts in those reports concerning the reasonable royalty analysis, which shall be understand to include any report or document in support marked by Defendant as Confidential or Attorneys Eyes Only, which relief also expressly allows Mr. Pridham access to pretrial preparation materials and demonstrative exhibits that may or will also include such information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/29/10. (ehs, )
July 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 553 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 385 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings, Terminate Motions,,, by AOL, LLC., America Online, Inc., Bright Response LLC, Google Inc., Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Jennifer)
July 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 552 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document (Exhibit included): 547 Sealed Response to Motion,. (Weiss, Andrew) Modified on 7/29/2010 (sm, ).
July 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 551 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document (Exhibit B that was not imaged in main document): 548 Sealed Response to Motion,. (Wiley, Elizabeth) Modified on 7/29/2010 (sm, ).
July 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 550 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Spangler, Andrew)
July 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 549 Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply TO YAHOO'S MOTION TO EXCLUDE (DKT. NO. 485) by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Wiley, Elizabeth)
July 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 548 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 505 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Certain Opinions of Plantiff's Damages Expert Stephen L. Becker filed by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 DECLARATION, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C)(Wiley, Elizabeth)
July 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 547 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 525 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Testimony and Opinions of Dr. V. Thomas Rhyne filed by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 DECLARATION, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G)(Weiss, Andrew)
July 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 558 CORRECTED Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 7/28/2010. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign-in Sheet) (jml)
July 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 557 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 7/28/2010. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign-in Sheet) (jml)
July 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 546 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 492 SEALED MOTION in Limine to Preclude Testimony by Dr. Edward A. Fox filed by AOL, LLC., Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
July 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 545 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 526 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony from Mary A. Woodford Regarding Lump Sum Royalty (Corrects Doc No. 499) SEALED MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony from Mary A. Woodford Regarding Lump Sum Royalty (Corrects Doc No. 499) filed by Bright Response LLC. (Hoffman, Adam)
July 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 544 ORDER granting 520 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Defendants may exceed the page limit in response to Plaintiffs Motions in Limine 3-33.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/28/10. (ehs, )
July 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 543 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 530 SEALED MOTION in Limine to Preclude Testimony by Dr. James Allan filed by Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 White Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C)(Doan, Jennifer)
July 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 542 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 478 SEALED MOTION for Discovery Sanctions filed by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of David Pridham, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Affidavit of Andrew Spangler, # 6 Exhibit A, # 7 Exhibit B, # 8 Exhibit C, # 9 Exhibit D, # 10 Exhibit E, # 11 Exhibit F, # 12 Exhibit G, # 13 Exhibit H, # 14 Exhibit I, # 15 Exhibit J, # 16 Exhibit K, # 17 Exhibit L, # 18 Exhibit M, # 19 Exhibit N, # 20 Exhibit O, # 21 Exhibit P)(Wiley, Elizabeth)
July 28, 2010 Opinion or Order ***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 537,538,539,541, Response. Attorney will refile PLEASE IGNORE.*** (rml, )
July 28, 2010 Opinion or Order DOCUMENT #523 RESPONSE WAS SEALED BY REQUEST OF ATTY. (sm, )
July 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 541 **PLEASE IGNORE - ATTY WILL REFILE *** SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 537 Sealed Response to Motion. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit H, # 2 Exhibit I, # 3 Exhibit J, # 4 Exhibit K, # 5 Exhibit L, # 6 Exhibit M, # 7 Exhibit N, # 8 Exhibit O, # 9 Exhibit P, # 10 Exhibit Q)(Spangler, Andrew) Modified on 7/28/2010 (rml, ).
July 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 540 NOTICE by AOL, LLC., America Online, Inc., Google Inc. re 505 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Certain Opinions of Plantiff's Damages Expert Stephen L. Becker, 525 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Testimony and Opinions of Dr. V. Thomas Rhyne (NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR HEARING) (Ainsworth, Jennifer)
July 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 539 **PLEASE IGNORE - ATTY WILL REFILE ***SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 537 Sealed Response to Motion. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Spangler Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G)(Spangler, Andrew) Modified on 7/28/2010 (rml, ).
July 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 538 **PLEASE IGNORE - ATTY WILL REFILE *** SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 537 Sealed Response to Motion. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Spangler, Andrew) Modified on 7/28/2010 (rml, ).
July 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 537 **PLEASE IGNORE - ATTY WILL REFILE*** SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 478 SEALED MOTION for Discovery Sanctions filed by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Pridham Declaration)(Spangler, Andrew) Modified on 7/28/2010 (rml, ).
July 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 536 SEALED MOTION Emergency Motion to Strike the Late Served Supplemental Expert Report of W. Christopher Bakewell, Google's Damages Expert by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Goldman Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B)(Wiley, Elizabeth) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/28/2010: # 4 Text of Proposed Order) (sm, ).
July 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 535 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Spangler, Andrew)
July 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 534 RESPONSE in Opposition re 527 MOTION to Strike /Exclude Expert Testimony from Dr. L. Karl Branting Regarding Written Description Under Daubert and Rule 702 of the Federal Rules of Evidence filed by AOL, LLC., America Online, Inc., Google Inc., Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Scott Sherwin, # 2 Exhibit 1)(Doan, Jennifer)
July 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 533 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 526 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony from Mary A. Woodford Regarding Lump Sum Royalty (Corrects Doc No. 499) SEALED MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony from Mary A. Woodford Regarding Lump Sum Royalty (Corrects Doc No. 499) filed by Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Scott Sherwin, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2)(Doan, Jennifer)
July 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 532 REPLY to Response to Motion re 415 Emergency MOTION to Strike Portions of Defendants' Invalidity Expert's Report and Defendants' Summary Judgment Briefing and Request for Expedited Briefing filed by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Andrew D. Weiss, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C)(Weiss, Andrew)
July 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 531 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 392 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity filed by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Andrew D. Weiss, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B)(Weiss, Andrew)
July 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 530 SEALED MOTION in Limine to Preclude Testimony by Dr. James Allan by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Patrick Anderson, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Anderson, Patrick)
July 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 529 ORDER withdrawing 496 Sealed Motion; granting 502 Motion to Withdraw 496 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/27/10. (ehs, )
July 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 528 ORDER granting 488 Motion to Withdraw 430 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Audrey Spangenberg from Testifying at Trial, 488 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw 430 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Audrey Spangenberg from Testifying at TrialUnopposed MOTION to Withdraw 430 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Audrey Spangenberg from Testifying at Trial. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/27/10. (ehs, )
July 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 527 MOTION to Strike /Exclude Expert Testimony from Dr. L. Karl Branting Regarding Written Description Under Daubert and Rule 702 of the Federal Rules of Evidence by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Elizabeth Wiley, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Wiley, Elizabeth)
July 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 526 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony from Mary A. Woodford Regarding Lump Sum Royalty (Corrects Doc No. 499) by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Adam Hoffman, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Hoffman, Adam)
July 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 525 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Testimony and Opinions of Dr. V. Thomas Rhyne by AOL, LLC., America Online, Inc., Google Inc., Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of M. Kammerud, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Affidavit Declaration of J. Thane, # 7 Exhibit 1, # 8 Exhibit 2, # 9 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
July 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 524 Additional Attachments to Main Document (Certificate of Conference ): Notice of Deficiency, 505 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Certain Opinions of Plantiff's Damages Expert Stephen L. Becker.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kammerud, Margaret) Modified on 7/27/2010 (sm, ).
July 27, 2010 Opinion or Order NOTICE of DEFICIENCY regarding the #499 Sealed Motion to exclude testimony of Woodford submitted by Bright Response LLC. No cert of conference included. Correction should be made by 1 business day; this motion is now terminated. (sm, )
July 27, 2010 Opinion or Order NOTICE of DEFICIENCY regarding the #494 Motion to exclude testimony of Dr Rhyne submitted by AOL, LLC., Google Inc., Yahoo!, Inc.. No cert of conference included. Correction should be made by 1 business day. This motion is now terminated. (sm, )
July 27, 2010 Opinion or Order NOTICE of DEFICIENCY regarding the #484 Motion to strike submitted by Bright Response LLC. No certificate of conference included and no proposed order attached. Correction should be made by 1 business day and refiled. This motion is now terminated. (sm, )
July 27, 2010 Opinion or Order ***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 510 and 517, Response w/additional attachments. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ehs, )
July 27, 2010 Opinion or Order *** Document # 487, Response sealed per request of counsel*** (ehs, )
July 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 523 ***SEALED PER ATTY***SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 462 SEALED MOTION in Limine No. 1 by Google (Using Documents Produced by Yahoo) filed by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Wiley Decl, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D)(Wiley, Elizabeth) Modified on 7/28/2010 (sm, ). Modified on 7/28/2010 (sm, ).
July 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 522 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 476 SEALED MOTION (Defendant Yahoo!'s Motions in Limine No. 3 - Reliance on Past Licenses of Large Search Advertising) filed by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Wiley Decl, # 2 Exhibit A)(Wiley, Elizabeth)
July 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 521 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS (Exhibit B) to Main Document: 513 Sealed Response to Motion in Limine 10. (Anderson, Patrick)
July 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 520 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO EXCEED THE PAGE LIMIT IN DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTIONS IN LIMINE 3-33 by AOL, LLC., America Online, Inc., Google Inc., Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer)
July 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 519 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 464 SEALED MOTION in Limine No. 4 filed by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Wiley Decl, # 2 Exhibit A)(Anderson, Patrick)
July 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 518 RESPONSE to Motion re 446 SEALED MOTION in Limine 9 (joint) Admissibility of Reexamination Proceedings filed by Bright Response LLC. (Wiley, Elizabeth)
July 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 517 ***FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY***Additional Attachments to Main Document: 510 Response to Motion.. (Wiley, Elizabeth) Modified on 7/27/2010 (ehs, ).
July 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 516 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 445 SEALED MOTION in Limine 8 (joint) SEALED MOTION in Limine 8 (joint) filed by Bright Response LLC. (Anderson, Patrick)
July 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 515 RESPONSE to Motion re 444 MOTION in Limine 6 (joint) MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 6: MOTION TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE AND ARGUMENT THAT ALLEN DOES NOT DISCLOSE A "NON-INTERACTIVE ELECTRONIC MESSAGE" filed by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 DECLARATION, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C)(Weiss, Andrew)
July 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 514 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 476 SEALED MOTION (Defendant Yahoo!'s Motions in Limine No. 1 ) filed by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Wiley Decl, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B)(Wiley, Elizabeth)
July 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 513 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 451 SEALED MOTION to Strike and Motion in Limine 10 (joint) SEALED MOTION to Strike and Motion in Limine 10 (joint) SEALED MOTION to Strike and Motion in Limine 10 (joint) filed by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Wiley Decl, # 2 Exhibit A)(Anderson, Patrick)
July 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 512 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 450 SEALED MOTION in Limine 4 (joint) filed by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 DECLARATION, # 2 Exhibit A)(Weiss, Andrew)
July 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 511 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 448 MOTION in Limine No. 12 Constructive Notice (Defts Joint) filed by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Wiley Decl, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B)(Wiley, Elizabeth)
July 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 510 ***FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY***RESPONSE to Motion re 447 MOTION in Limine 11 (joint) (Indirect Infringement) filed by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Wiley Decl, # 2 Exhibit A)(Wiley, Elizabeth) Modified on 7/27/2010 (ehs, ).
July 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 509 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 441 SEALED MOTION in Limine 2 (joint) SEALED MOTION in Limine 2 (joint) filed by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 DECLARATION, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F)(Weiss, Andrew)
July 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 508 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 453 SEALED MOTION in Limine Nos. 3-33 filed by AOL, LLC., America Online, Inc., Google Inc., Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of M. Kammerud, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Affidavit Declaration of M. Shah, # 15 Exhibit 1, # 16 Exhibit 2, # 17 Exhibit 3, # 18 Exhibit 4, # 19 Exhibit 5, # 20 Exhibit 6, # 21 Exhibit 7, # 22 Exhibit 8, # 23 Exhibit 9, # 24 Exhibit 10, # 25 Exhibit 11)(Perlson, David)
July 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 507 RESPONSE in Opposition re 460 MOTION in Limine Number 1 (Uncharted Prior Art References): Motion to Preclude Defendants' Reliance on or Reference to Uncharted Prior Art References (EZ Reader Manual and CBR Express Manuals) and Hearsay MOTION in Limine Number 1 (Uncharted Prior Art References): Motion to Preclude Defendants' Reliance on or Reference to Uncharted Prior Art References (EZ Reader Manual and CBR Express Manuals) and Hearsay MOTION in Limine Number 1 (Uncharted Prior Art References): Motion to Preclude Defendants' Reliance on or Reference to Uncharted Prior Art References (EZ Reader Manual and CBR Express Manuals) and Hearsay filed by AOL, LLC., Google Inc., Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Sistos Decl. ISO Defendants' Response, # 2 Branting Decl ISO Defendants' Response, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit, # 13 Exhibit, # 14 Exhibit, # 15 Exhibit, # 16 Exhibit, # 17 Exhibit, # 18 Exhibit, # 19 Exhibit, # 20 Exhibit, # 21 Exhibit, # 22 Exhibit, # 23 Exhibit, # 24 Exhibit, # 25 Exhibit, # 26 Exhibit, # 27 Exhibit, # 28 Exhibit)(Sistos, Antonio)
July 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 506 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 457 SEALED MOTION in Limine 7 (joint) SEALED MOTION in Limine 7 (joint) filed by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Hoffman, Adam)
July 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 505 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Certain Opinions of Plantiff's Damages Expert Stephen L. Becker by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Antos Declaration, # 2 Affidavit Smith Declaration, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G, # 10 Exhibit H, # 11 Exhibit I part 1, # 12 Exhibit I part 2, # 13 Exhibit J, # 14 Exhibit K)(Smith, Kevin)
July 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 504 RESPONSE to Motion re 442 MOTION in Limine 3 (joint) MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3: MOTION TO PRECLUDE LEGALLY INCORRECT EVIDENCE AND ARGUMENT REGARDING THE INVENTORS AND DEPLOYMENT OF THE EZ READER SYSTEM filed by Bright Response LLC. (Weiss, Andrew)
July 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 503 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 454 Google and AOL SEALED MOTION in Limine No.2 (Wealth/Overall Revenues filed by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Wiley Decl, # 2 Exhibit A)(Wiley, Elizabeth)
July 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 502 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw 496 SEALED MOTION in Limine to Preclude Testimony by Dr. James Allan by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Anderson, Patrick)
July 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 501 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 476 SEALED MOTION (Defendant Yahoo!'s Motions in Limine No. 2 Stanford License) filed by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Wiley Decl, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B)(Wiley, Elizabeth)
July 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 500 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 449 SEALED MOTION in Limine 13 (joint) SEALED MOTION in Limine 13 (joint) filed by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 DECLARATION, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G)(Weiss, Andrew)
July 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 499 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT, PLEASE IGNORE.***SEALED MOTION To Exclude Expert Testimony from Mary A. Woodford Regarding Lump Sum Royalty by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Adam Hoffman, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Hoffman, Adam) Modified on 7/27/2010 (sm, ).
July 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 498 RESPONSE to Motion re 476 SEALED MOTION (Defendant Yahoo!'s Motions in Limine) No. 5 Limit Expert Testimony to Reports filed by Bright Response LLC. (Wiley, Elizabeth)
July 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 497 RESPONSE to Motion re 447 MOTION in Limine 11 (joint) (Indirect Infringement) filed by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Wiley Decl, # 2 Exhibit A)(Wiley, Elizabeth)
July 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 496 ***WITHDRAWN PER ORDER # 529 *** SEALED MOTION in Limine to Preclude Testimony by Dr. James Allan by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Anderson Decl, # 2 Exhibit A)(Anderson, Patrick) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/27/2010: # 3 Text of Proposed Order) (sm, ). Modified on 7/27/2010 (ehs, ).
July 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 495 RESPONSE to Motion re 476 SEALED MOTION (Defendant Yahoo!'s Motions in Limine) No. 4 Discovery Conduct and Source Code Production filed by Bright Response LLC. (Wiley, Elizabeth)
July 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 494 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT, PLEASE IGNORE.***SEALED MOTION to Exclude Testimony and Opinions of Dr. V. Thomas Rhyne by AOL, LLC., Google Inc., Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Margaret P. Kammerud, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Affidavit of Joshua Thane, # 7 Exhibit 1, # 8 Exhibit 2, # 9 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David) Modified on 7/27/2010 (sm, ).
July 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 493 RESPONSE to Motion re 455 SEALED MOTION in Limine 3 (Discovery Conduct) filed by Bright Response LLC. (Wiley, Elizabeth)
July 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 492 SEALED MOTION in Limine to Preclude Testimony by Dr. Edward A. Fox by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Anderson Decl, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B)(Anderson, Patrick) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/27/2010: # 4 Text of Proposed Order) (sm, ).
July 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 491 RESPONSE to Motion re 443 SEALED MOTION in Limine 5 (joint) (Priority Date) filed by Bright Response LLC. (Wiley, Elizabeth)
July 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 490 RESPONSE in Opposition re 439 MOTION in Limine Number 2 (Testimony of Chuck Williams) filed by AOL, LLC., America Online, Inc., Google Inc., Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Todd Kennedy, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Affidavit of James Charles Williams, # 11 Exhibit A, # 12 Exhibit B, # 13 Exhibit C)(Perlson, David)
July 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 489 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 440 SEALED MOTION in Limine 1 by Defts(Joint) (Re Spangenberg Family Foundation and Ties to Plainiff) filed by Bright Response LLC. (Wiley, Elizabeth)
July 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 488 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw 430 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Audrey Spangenberg from Testifying at Trial by AOL, LLC., America Online, Inc., Google Inc., Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Jennifer)
July 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 487 ***SEALED PER REQUEST OF COUNSEL***RESPONSE to Motion re 473 Emergency MOTION to Allow Bright Response Counsel Mr. David Pridham Access to Expert Reports on Damages and All Documents Relied Upon in Those Reports to Support a Reasonable Royalty Analysis, Including Access to PreTrial Preparation Materials and Demon (Defendants' Response to Bright Response, LLC's Emergency Motion to Allow David Pridham Access to Confidential Financial and Damages Information [Dkt. No. 473]) filed by AOL, LLC., America Online, Inc., Google Inc., Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Doan, Jennifer) Modified on 7/27/2010 (ehs, ).
July 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 486 NOTICE by Yahoo!, Inc. re 485 SEALED MOTION (Yahoo!'s Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Plaintiff's Damages Expert Stephen Becker) SEALED MOTION (Yahoo!'s Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Plaintiff's Damages Expert Stephen Becker) (Notice for Request for Hearing) (Doan, Jennifer)
July 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 485 SEALED MOTION (Yahoo!'s Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Plaintiff's Damages Expert Stephen Becker) by Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration of J. Thane, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5)(Doan, Jennifer)
July 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 484 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT, PLEASE IGNORE.***MOTION to Strike or Exclude Expert Testimony From Dr. L. Karl Branting Regarding Written Description Under Daubert and Rule 702 of the Federal Rules of Evidence by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Wiley Decl, # 2 Exhibit A)(Wiley, Elizabeth) Modified on 7/27/2010 (sm, ).
July 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 483 Emergency MOTION to Expedite (Emergency Motion for Expedited Briefing Schedule and Request for Hearing regarding Dkt. Nos. 410, 412, & 478) by AOL, LLC., America Online, Inc., Google Inc., Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer)
July 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 482 ORDER - The defendants are ordered to jointly respond to the plaintiffs motion no later than Tuesday, July 27, 2010 at 3:00 p.m. Central Daylight Time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/26/10. (ehs, )
July 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 481 ORDER denying 387 Sealed Motion for summary judgment of invalidity for failure to satisfy the written description requirement (Dkt. No. 387) and the plaintiff Bright Response, LLCs (Bright Response) cross-motion for summary judgment that the written description requirement is satisfied (Dkt. No. 420). Because there are genuine issues of material fact regarding compliance with the written description requirement, the court DENIES both motions for summary judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/26/10. (ehs, )
July 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 480 ORDER finding as moot 195 Sealed Motion to compel source code. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/26/10. (ehs, )
July 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 479 ORDER granting 474 Motion for Access to Non-Google, Non-AOL and Non-Yahoo! Confidential Documents. That Mr. Pridham may have access to any CONFIDENTIAL or CONFIDENTIAL OUTSIDE COUNSEL ONLY documents not produced by Google, AOL or Yahoo; 2. That Mr. Pridham may have access to any documents produced by Google, AOL or Yahoo that were designated CONFIDENTIAL; and 3. That Mr. Pridham may have access to CONFIDENTIAL OUTSIDE COUNSEL ONLY documents produced by Google, AOL or Yahoo that counsel for Google, AOL or Yahoo, as appropriate, have agreed do not contain Google, AOL or Yahoo information.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/26/10. (ehs, )
July 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 478 SEALED MOTION for Discovery Sanctions by AOL, LLC., Google Inc., Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Perlson Declaration, # 2 Affidavit Novikov Declaration, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G, # 10 Exhibit H, # 11 Exhibit I, # 12 Exhibit J, # 13 Exhibit K, # 14 Exhibit L, # 15 Exhibit M, # 16 Exhibit N, # 17 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Kevin)
July 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 477 NOTICE by Yahoo!, Inc. re 387 SEALED MOTION Yahoo! Inc.'s Motion For Summary Judgment Of Invalidity For Failure To Satisfy The Written Description Requirement of 35 U.S.C. § 112, 394 SEALED MOTION Yahoo! Inc.'s Motion For Summary Judgment Of Non-Infringement, 392 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity (Notice for Request for Hearing) (Doan, Jennifer)
July 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 476 SEALED MOTION (Defendant Yahoo!'s Motions in Limine) by Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Thane Declaration, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4)(Doan, Jennifer)
July 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 475 NOTICE by AOL, LLC., America Online, Inc., Google Inc. re 388 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement, 392 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity (NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR HEARING) (Ainsworth, Jennifer)
July 23, 2010 Opinion or Order ***FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY. Document # 456, Motion. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ehs, )
July 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 474 Unopposed MOTION for Access to Non-Google, Non-AOL and Non-Yahoo! Confidential Documents by David Pridham by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Spangler, Andrew)
July 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 473 Emergency MOTION to Allow Bright Response Counsel Mr. David Pridham Access to Expert Reports on Damages and All Documents Relied Upon in Those Reports to Support a Reasonable Royalty Analysis, Including Access to PreTrial Preparation Materials and Demonstrative Exhibits in Support of Preparing Bright Response's Damages Case by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wiley, Elizabeth)
July 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 472 Additional Attachments to Main Document: 439 MOTION in Limine Number 2 (Testimony of Chuck Williams), 460 MOTION in Limine Number 1 (Uncharted Prior Art References): Motion to Preclude Defendants' Reliance on or Reference to Uncharted Prior Art References (EZ Reader Manual and CBR Express Manuals) and Hearsay MOTION in Limine Number 1 (Uncharted Prior Art References): Motion to Preclude Defendants' Reliance on or Reference to Uncharted Prior Art References (EZ Reader Manual and CBR Express Manuals) and Hearsay MOTION in Limine Number 1 (Uncharted Prior Art References): Motion to Preclude Defendants' Reliance on or Reference to Uncharted Prior Art References (EZ Reader Manual and CBR Express Manuals) and Hearsay, 453 SEALED MOTION in Limine Nos. 3-33.. (Wiley, Elizabeth)
July 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 471 Additional Attachments to Main Document: 457 SEALED MOTION in Limine 7 (joint) SEALED MOTION in Limine 7 (joint), 462 SEALED MOTION in Limine No. 1, 444 MOTION in Limine 6 (joint), 441 SEALED MOTION in Limine 2 (joint) SEALED MOTION in Limine 2 (joint), 449 SEALED MOTION in Limine 13 (joint) SEALED MOTION in Limine 13 (joint), 450 SEALED MOTION in Limine 4 (joint), 454 SEALED MOTION in Limine 2, 440 SEALED MOTION in Limine 1 (Joint) SEALED MOTION in Limine 1 (Joint), 455 SEALED MOTION in Limine 3, 447 MOTION in Limine 11 (joint), 446 SEALED MOTION in Limine 9 (joint), 464 SEALED MOTION in Limine No. 4, 443 SEALED MOTION in Limine 5 (joint), 442 MOTION in Limine 3 (joint), 448 MOTION in Limine 12 (joint), 445 SEALED MOTION in Limine 8 (joint) SEALED MOTION in Limine 8 (joint), 451 SEALED MOTION to Strike and Motion in Limine 10 (joint) SEALED MOTION to Strike and Motion in Limine 10 (joint) SEALED MOTION to Strike and Motion in Limine 10 (joint).. (Kammerud, Margaret)
July 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 470 Additional Attachments to Main Document: 456 SEALED MOTION (Defendant Yahoo! Inc.'s Motions In Limine).. (Doan, Jennifer)
July 23, 2010 Opinion or Order ***FILED IN ERROR. ORDERS ARE NOT FILED ON DOCKET SEPARATELY Document # 466, Additional attachment. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (CLERK HAS ATTACHED ORDER TO # 453)(ch, )
July 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 469 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 459 Reply to Response to Motion,. (Doan, Jennifer)
July 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 468 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 456 SEALED MOTION (Defendant Yahoo! Inc.'s Motions In Limine). (Doan, Jennifer)
July 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 467 Additional Attachments to Main Document: 439 MOTION in Limine Number 2 (Testimony of Chuck Williams).. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B)(Wiley, Elizabeth)
July 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 466 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE.***Additional Attachments to Main Document: 453 SEALED MOTION in Limine Nos. 3-33.. (Wiley, Elizabeth) Modified on 7/23/2010 (ch, ).
July 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 465 REPLY to Response to Motion re 391 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment on Google's Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims, 389 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment on Defendant AOL's Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims, 390 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment on Defendant Yahoo filed by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Wiley Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H)(Wiley, Elizabeth)
July 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 464 SEALED MOTION in Limine No. 4 by America Online, Inc., Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Andrea Pallios Roberts, # 2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Andrea Pallios Roberts, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
July 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 463 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 394 SEALED MOTION Yahoo! Inc.'s Motion For Summary Judgment Of Non-Infringement filed by Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 White Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2)(Doan, Jennifer)
July 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 462 SEALED MOTION in Limine No. 1 by America Online, Inc., Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Andrea Pallios Roberts, # 2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Andrea Pallios Roberts, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
July 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 461 SEALED ADDITIONAL EXHIBIT D to Main Document: 457 SEALED MOTION in Limine 7 (joint) SEALED MOTION in Limine 7 (joint). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit D-2, # 2 Exhibit D-3)(Candido, Amy)
July 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 460 MOTION in Limine Number 1 (Uncharted Prior Art References): Motion to Preclude Defendants' Reliance on or Reference to Uncharted Prior Art References (EZ Reader Manual and CBR Express Manuals) and Hearsay by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Wiley Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E PART I, # 7 Exhibit E PART II, # 8 Exhibit E PART III, # 9 Exhibit F, # 10 Exhibit G, # 11 Exhibit H, # 12 Exhibit I, # 13 Exhibit J, # 14 Exhibit K, # 15 Text of Proposed Order)(Spangler, Andrew)
July 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 459 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 387 SEALED MOTION Yahoo! Inc.'s Motion For Summary Judgment Of Invalidity For Failure To Satisfy The Written Description Requirement of 35 U.S.C. § 112 filed by Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of S. Sherwin, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3)(Doan, Jennifer) Modified on 7/23/2010 (ch, ).
July 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 458 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 388 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement filed by AOL, LLC., Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Eugene Novikov, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4)(Perlson, David)
July 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 457 SEALED MOTION in Limine 7 (joint) by AOL, LLC., America Online, Inc., Google Inc., Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of J. Thane, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Affidavit Declaration of A. Roberts, # 5 Exhibit A, # 6 Exhibit B, # 7 Exhibit C, # 8 Exhibit E, # 9 Exhibit F, # 10 Text of Proposed Order)(Candido, Amy)
July 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 456 ***FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY***SEALED MOTION (Defendant Yahoo! Inc.'s Motions In Limine) by Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration of Josh Thane, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4)(Doan, Jennifer) Modified on 7/23/2010 (ehs, ).
July 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 455 SEALED MOTION in Limine 3 by AOL, LLC., America Online, Inc., Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of M. Kammerud, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
July 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 454 SEALED MOTION in Limine 2 by AOL, LLC., America Online, Inc., Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of A. Roberts, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
July 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 453 SEALED MOTION in Limine Nos. 3-33 by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Elizabeth Wiley, # 2 Exhibit A)(Wiley, Elizabeth) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/23/2010: # 3 Text of Proposed Order) (ch, ).
July 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 452 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 392 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity filed by AOL, LLC., America Online, Inc., Google Inc., Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Andrea Pallios Roberts, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B)(Perlson, David)
July 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 451 SEALED MOTION to Strike and Motion in Limine 10 (joint) by AOL, LLC., America Online, Inc., Google Inc., Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of S. Sherwin, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Affidavit Declaration of E. Novikov, # 4 Exhibit A, # 5 Exhibit B-1, # 6 Exhibit B-2, # 7 Exhibit B-3, # 8 Exhibit B-4, # 9 Exhibit B-5, # 10 Exhibit B-6, # 11 Exhibit B-7, # 12 Exhibit B-8, # 13 Exhibit B-9, # 14 Exhibit C, # 15 Exhibit D, # 16 Text of Proposed Order)(Candido, Amy)
July 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 450 SEALED MOTION in Limine 4 (joint) by AOL, LLC., America Online, Inc., Google Inc., Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of M. Kammerud, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Candido, Amy)
July 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 449 SEALED MOTION in Limine 13 (joint) by AOL, LLC., America Online, Inc., Google Inc., Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of E. Novikov, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Candido, Amy)
July 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 448 MOTION in Limine 12 (joint) by AOL, LLC., America Online, Inc., Google Inc., Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Candido, Amy)
July 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 447 MOTION in Limine 11 (joint) by AOL, LLC., America Online, Inc., Google Inc., Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Candido, Amy)
July 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 446 SEALED MOTION in Limine 9 (joint) by AOL, LLC., America Online, Inc., Google Inc., Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of M. Kammerud, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Candido, Amy)
July 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 445 SEALED MOTION in Limine 8 (joint) by AOL, LLC., America Online, Inc., Google Inc., Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of S. Sherwin, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Affidavit Declaration of A. Roberts, # 4 Exhibit A, # 5 Exhibit B, # 6 Exhibit C, # 7 Exhibit D, # 8 Exhibit E, # 9 Exhibit F, # 10 Exhibit G, # 11 Exhibit H, # 12 Exhibit I, # 13 Exhibit J, # 14 Exhibit K, # 15 Text of Proposed Order)(Candido, Amy)
July 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 444 MOTION in Limine 6 (joint) by AOL, LLC., America Online, Inc., Google Inc., Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of M. Kammerud, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Candido, Amy)
July 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 443 SEALED MOTION in Limine 5 (joint) by AOL, LLC., America Online, Inc., Google Inc., Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of J. Thane, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Candido, Amy)
July 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 442 MOTION in Limine 3 (joint) by AOL, LLC., America Online, Inc., Google Inc., Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Candido, Amy)
July 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 441 SEALED MOTION in Limine 2 (joint) by AOL, LLC., America Online, Inc., Google Inc., Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of M. Kammerud, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Candido, Amy)
July 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 440 SEALED MOTION in Limine 1 (Joint) by AOL, LLC., America Online, Inc., Google Inc., Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of M. Kammerud, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Candido, Amy)
July 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 439 MOTION in Limine Number 2 (Testimony of Chuck Williams) by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Elizabeth Wiley, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Wiley, Elizabeth)
July 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 438 ORDER denying 386 Motion to preclude portions of pltf's expert report. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/22/10. (ehs, )
July 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 437 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Patrick Curran for Google Inc. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-1-5494. (ch, )
July 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 436 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael S Brophy on behalf of Bright Response LLC (Brophy, Michael)
July 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 435 Additional Attachments to Main Document: (CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE) 430 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Audrey Spangenberg from Testifying at Trial.. (Kammerud, Margaret) Modified on 7/20/2010 (ch, ).
July 20, 2010 Opinion or Order ***Document # 430, Motion MODIFIED to add EMERGENTY to the document heading per request of attorney.*** (ehs, )
July 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 434 Sealed Document. (Joint Final Pre-Trial Order) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Plaintiff's Witness List, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Plaintiff's Amended Deposition Designations with Errata, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Google & AOL's Amended Witness List, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Yahoo's Witness List, # 5 Exhibit 5 - Defendants' Deposition Designations, # 6 Exhibit 6 - Plaintiff's Amended Exhibit List, # 7 Exhibit Defendants' Trial Exhibit List)(Wiley, Elizabeth) Modified on 7/20/2010 (ch, ).
July 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 433 NOTICE by AOL, LLC., America Online, Inc., Google Inc., Yahoo!, Inc. of Compliance (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Post-Trial Jury Instructions, # 2 Exhibit Proposed Pre-Trial Jury Instructions, # 3 Exhibit Proposed Verdict Form)(Perlson, David)
July 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 432 Proposed Jury Instructions by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Post-Trial Instructions, # 2 Exhibit B - Pre-Trial Instructions, # 3 Exhibit C - Proposed Verdict Form)(Wiley, Elizabeth)
July 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 431 SEALED Response to Motion re 415 Emergency MOTION to Strike Portions of Defendants' Invalidity Expert's Report and Defendants' Summary Judgment Briefing and Request for Expedited Briefing filed by AOL, LLC., America Online, Inc., Google Inc., Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of A. Roberts, # 2 Exhibit A-1, # 3 Exhibit A-2, # 4 Exhibit A-3, # 5 Exhibit B, # 6 Exhibit C, # 7 Exhibit D, # 8 Exhibit E, # 9 Exhibit F, # 10 Exhibit G, # 11 Exhibit H, # 12 Exhibit I, # 13 Exhibit J, # 14 Exhibit K, # 15 Exhibit L, # 16 Exhibit M, # 17 Exhibit N, # 18 Exhibit O, # 19 Exhibit P, # 20 Exhibit Q, # 21 Exhibit R, # 22 Exhibit S, # 23 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
July 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 430 ***WITHDRAWN PER ORDER # 528 *** EMERGENCY SEALED MOTION to Exclude Audrey Spangenberg from Testifying at Trial by AOL, LLC., America Online, Inc., Google Inc., Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of John LaBarre, # 2 Affidavit Declaration of David A. Perlson, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G, # 10 Exhibit H, # 11 Exhibit I, # 12 Exhibit J, # 13 Exhibit K, # 14 Exhibit L, # 15 Exhibit M, # 16 Exhibit N, # 17 Exhibit O, # 18 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David) Modified on 7/20/2010 (ehs, ). Modified on 7/27/2010 (ehs, ).
July 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 429 ORDER REGARDING EXHIBITS - due to the voluminious exhibits expected to be tendered during the trial of this case the courts ORDERES the following herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/19/2010. (ch, )
July 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 428 Additional Attachments to Main Document: 423 Sealed Response to Motion,,,,.. (Perlson, David)
July 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 427 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 426 Sealed Response to Motion,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B - 1 of 3, # 2 Exhibit B - 2 of 3, # 3 Exhibit B - 3 of 3)(Wiley, Elizabeth)
July 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 426 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 386 SEALED MOTION to Preclude Plaintiff from Submitting an Expert Report That Relies on Infringement Theories Not Adequately Disclosed in Plaintiff's Interrogatory Responses filed by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Elizabeth Wiley, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Wiley, Elizabeth)
July 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 425 Sealed Notice of Errata re: Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion for Summary Judgment on Defendants Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit F)(Perlson, David)
July 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 424 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian A E Smith on behalf of Yahoo!, Inc. (Smith, Brian)
July 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 423 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 391 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment on Google's Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims, 389 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment on Defendant AOL's Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims, 390 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment on Defendant Yahoo filed by AOL, LLC., America Online, Inc., Google Inc., Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Andrea Roberts, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C-1, # 5 Exhibit C-2, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G, # 10 Exhibit H, # 11 Exhibit I-1, # 12 Exhibit I-2, # 13 Exhibit J, # 14 Exhibit K, # 15 Exhibit L, # 16 Exhibit M, # 17 Exhibit N, # 18 Exhibit O, # 19 Exhibit P, # 20 Exhibit Q, # 21 Exhibit R-1, # 22 Exhibit R-2, # 23 Exhibit S, # 24 Exhibit T, # 25 Exhibit U, # 26 Exhibit V, # 27 Exhibit W, # 28 Exhibit X, # 29 Exhibit Y, # 30 Exhibit Z, # 31 Exhibit AA, # 32 Exhibit BB, # 33 Exhibit CC, # 34 Exhibit DD, # 35 Exhibit EE, # 36 Affidavit of Karl Branting and Ex. 1, # 37 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/16/2010: # 38 REVISED ORDER) (ch, ).
July 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 422 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 420 Response to Motion, 419 Sealed Response to Motion. (Fenster, Marc)
July 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 421 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 419 Sealed Response to Motion, 420 Response to Motion. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K)(Fenster, Marc)
July 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 420 RESPONSE to Motion re 387 SEALED MOTION Yahoo! Inc.'s Motion For Summary Judgment Of Invalidity For Failure To Satisfy The Written Description Requirement of 35 U.S.C. § 112 filed by Bright Response LLC. (Fenster, Marc)
July 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 419 SEALED RESPONSE to Defendants Motion re 392 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity filed by Bright Response LLC. (Fenster, Marc)
July 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 418 SEALED RESPONSE to Google and AOL Motion re 388 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement filed by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Rhyne Dec/Report, # 2 Exhibit B - Weiss Dec, # 3 Exhibit B-1, # 4 Exhibit B-2, # 5 Exhibit B-3, # 6 Exhibit B-4)(Fenster, Marc)
July 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 417 SEALED RESPONSE to Yahoo! Motion re 394 SEALED MOTION Yahoo! Inc.'s Motion For Summary Judgment Of Non-Infringement filed by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Fenster, Marc)
July 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 416 REPORT of Mediation by Jerry Grissom. Mediation result: impasse(ehs, )
July 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 415 Emergency MOTION to Strike Portions of Defendants' Invalidity Expert's Report and Defendants' Summary Judgment Briefing and Request for Expedited Briefing by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Elizabeth Wiley, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit A-1, # 4 Exhibit A-2, # 5 Exhibit A-3 - part 1, # 6 Exhibit A-3 - part 2, # 7 Exhibit A-3 - part 3, # 8 Exhibit A-4, # 9 Exhibit A-5 - part 1, # 10 Exhibit A-5 - part 2, # 11 Exhibit A-5 - part 3, # 12 Exhibit B, # 13 Exhibit C, # 14 Exhibit D, # 15 Exhibit E, # 16 Text of Proposed Order)(Wiley, Elizabeth)
July 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 414 ORDER granting 413 Motion to Withdraw its Motion for Verbal Reprimand to Yahoo Counsel for Continued and Vexatious Conduct with Respect to Mr. David Pridham and Request for Court Order Allowing Mr. Pridham to Participate in and Review Pre-trial Preparation Materials. Motion withdrawn without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 714/10. (ehs, )
July 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 413 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw 411 MOTION For Verbal Reprimand to Yahoo Cousel for Continued and Vexatious Conduct with Respect to Mr. David Pridham and Request for Court Order Allowing Mr. Pridham to Participate in and Review Pre-Trial Preparation Materials by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Spangler, Andrew)
July 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 412 Emergency SEALED MOTION (Yahoo!'s Emergency Motion to Strike Portions of Plaintiff's July 6, 2010 Expert Report on Damages) by Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B)(Thane, Joshua)
July 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 411 MOTION For Verbal Reprimand to Yahoo Cousel for Continued and Vexatious Conduct with Respect to Mr. David Pridham and Request for Court Order Allowing Mr. Pridham to Participate in and Review Pre-Trial Preparation Materials by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Spangler Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Wiley, Elizabeth)
July 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 410 SEALED MOTION Emergency Motion to Strike Portions of Plaintiff's July 6, 2010 Expert Reports on Damages by America Online, Inc., Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Andrea Pallios Roberts, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
July 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 409 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Todd M Kennedy for Google Inc..(APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-1-5469)(ehs, )
July 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 408 ORDER granting 407 Motion for Leave to File supplement its infringement contentions as set forth in the above-referenced stipulationto amend the cover pleading to assert claims 28, 30, 31, 33 and 38 of the '947 patent against Google. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/9/10. (ehs, )
July 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 407 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File (to Supplement its Infringement Contentions as to Google, Inc.) by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wiley, Elizabeth)
July 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 406 ORDER - granting 402 Motion to Withdraw Motion to Compel. Withdrawing 361 Sealed Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/7/2010. (ch, )
July 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 405 ORDER granting 401 Motion for Leave to Supplement its Infringement Contentions as to AOl. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/7/2010. (ch, )
July 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 404 NOTICE by Google Inc. Request for Daily Transcripts and Real Time Reporting of Court Proceedings (Perlson, David)
July 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 403 NOTICE by Bright Response LLC of Request for Daily Transcripts and Real Time Reporting of Court Proceedings (Spangler, Andrew)
July 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 402 Consent MOTION to Withdraw 361 SEALED MOTION To Compel Google Inc. To Produce Ad Spam Filtering Source Code And Related Witnesses by Bright Response LLC. (Weiss, Andrew) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/7/2010: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (ch, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/7/2010: # 2 REVISED ORDER) (ch, ).
July 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 401 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File (Supplement its Infringement Contentions as to AOL, LLC and America Online, Inc.) by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wiley, Elizabeth)
July 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 400 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Margaret Pirnie Kammerud for Google Inc. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-1-5462. (ch, )
July 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 399 ORDER granting 398 Motion for Leave to Supplement its Infringement Contentions.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/6/2010. (ch, )
July 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 398 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Infringement Contentions as to Yahoo by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wiley, Elizabeth)
July 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 397 STIPULATION between Bright Response and Google by Bright Response LLC. (Wiley, Elizabeth)
July 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 396 STIPULATION between Bright Response and Yahoo by Bright Response LLC. (Wiley, Elizabeth)
July 2, 2010 Opinion or Order NOTICE - clerk modified Document # 392, to show Sealed per request from attorney. (ch, )
July 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 395 Additional Attachments to Main Document: 392 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity.. (Perlson, David)
July 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 394 SEALED MOTION Yahoo! Inc.'s Motion For Summary Judgment Of Non-Infringement by Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration of Jason White, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G, # 10 Exhibit H, # 11 Exhibit I, # 12 Exhibit J, # 13 Declaration of Dave Kolm, # 14 Declaration of Jean-Marc Langois, # 15 Declaration of Zachary Zhang)(Doan, Jennifer)
July 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 393 NOTICE by Yahoo!, Inc. (Yahoo!'s Notice Of Request For Daily Transcripts And Real Time Reporting Of Court Proceedings) (Doan, Jennifer)
July 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 392 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity by AOL, LLC., America Online, Inc., Google Inc., Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Todd Kennedy, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit N, # 16 Exhibit O, # 17 Affidavit of Bradley Allen, # 18 Exhibit A, part 1 of 2, # 19 Exhibit A, part 2 of 2, # 20 Exhibit B)(Perlson, David) Modified on 7/2/2010 (ch, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/2/2010: # 21 Text of Proposed Order) (ch, ).
July 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 391 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment on Google's Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Elizabeth Wiley, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Wiley, Elizabeth)
July 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 390 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment on Defendant Yahoo by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Elizabeth Wiley, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Wiley, Elizabeth)
July 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 389 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment on Defendant AOL's Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Elizabeth Wiley, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Wiley, Elizabeth)
July 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 388 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement by AOL, LLC., America Online, Inc., Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Bartholomew Furrow, # 2 Affidavit of Jack Menzel, # 3 Affidavit of Bahman Rabii, # 4 Affidavit of Eugene Novikov, # 5 Exhibit A, # 6 Exhibit B, # 7 Exhibit C, # 8 Exhibit D-1, # 9 Exhibit D-2, # 10 Exhibit D-3, # 11 Exhibit D-4, # 12 Exhibit D-5, # 13 Exhibit D-6, # 14 Exhibit D-7, # 15 Exhibit D-8, # 16 Exhibit D-9, # 17 Exhibit E, # 18 Exhibit F-1, # 19 Exhibit F-2, # 20 Exhibit F-3, # 21 Exhibit F-4, # 22 Exhibit G, # 23 Exhibit H, # 24 Exhibit I, # 25 Exhibit J, # 26 Exhibit K, # 27 Exhibit L, # 28 Exhibit M-1, # 29 Exhibit M-2, # 30 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
July 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 387 SEALED MOTION Yahoo! Inc.'s Motion For Summary Judgment Of Invalidity For Failure To Satisfy The Written Description Requirement of 35 U.S.C. § 112 by Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration of Jason White, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C)(Doan, Jennifer)
June 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 386 SEALED MOTION to Preclude Plaintiff from Submitting an Expert Report That Relies on Infringement Theories Not Adequately Disclosed in Plaintiff's Interrogatory Responses by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Eugene Novikov, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B-1, # 4 Exhibit B-2, # 5 Exhibit B-3, # 6 Exhibit B-4, # 7 Exhibit C, # 8 Exhibit D, # 9 Exhibit E)(Perlson, David) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/1/2010: # 10 Text of Proposed Order) (ch, ).
June 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 385 AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER - Motions due by 7/22/2010., Proposed Pretrial Order due by 7/19/2010., Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/28/2010 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham.), Motions terminated: 384 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order filed by Google Inc., America Online, Inc., Yahoo!, Inc., AOL, LLC., Bright Response LLC.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/30/10. (ehs, )
June 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 384 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order by AOL, LLC., America Online, Inc., Bright Response LLC, Google Inc., Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer)
June 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 383 AMENDED AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/28/10. (ehs, )
June 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 382 REPORT of Mediation. Mediation result: impasse(ehs, )
June 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven: Settlement Conference held on 6/28/2010 between Plaintiff and Defendant Yahoo! Mediation resulted in an impasse. (Court Reporter none.) (lfs, )
June 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 381 Unopposed MOTION for Entry of Amended Protective Order by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Spangler, Andrew)
June 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 380 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Adam S Goldberg on behalf of Bright Response LLC (Goldberg, Adam)
June 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 379 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediator Jerry Grissom of JAMS, 8401 North Central Expressway, Suite 610, Dallas, Texas, 75225, telephone number 214/744-5267 and fax number 214/720- 6010, is hereby appointed as mediator. Mediation deadline is 7/1/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/24/2010. (ch, )
June 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 378 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Amy H Candido on behalf of Google Inc. (Candido, Amy)
June 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 377 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John C Hueston on behalf of Bright Response LLC (Hueston, John)
June 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 376 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney John C Hueston for Bright Response LLC. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-1-5432) (ehs, )
June 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 375 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Adam S Goldberg for Bright Response LLC. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-1-5431) (ehs, )
June 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 374 ORDER - the court will maintain the currently scheduled trial date of August 2, 2010. The parties are to meet and confer and submit an amended docket control order that conforms with this schedule. Should Googles counsel become available later in August, the court will consider scheduling the trial date later in the month. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/23/10. (ehs, )
June 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 373 ORDER denying 370 Motion to Stay. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/23/10. (ehs, )
June 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 372 REPLY to Response to Motion re 370 MOTION to Stay Yahoo! Inc.'s Motion For A Limited Stay Pending The Resolution Of Yahoo!'s Petition For Writ Of Mandamus To The Federal Circuit filed by Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Doan, Jennifer)
June 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 371 RESPONSE in Opposition re 370 MOTION to Stay Yahoo! Inc.'s Motion For A Limited Stay Pending The Resolution Of Yahoo!'s Petition For Writ Of Mandamus To The Federal Circuit filed by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Elizabeth Wiley, # 2 Exhibit A to Wiley Declaration, # 3 Affidavit of Andrew Weiss)(Wiley, Elizabeth)
June 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 370 MOTION to Stay Yahoo! Inc.'s Motion For A Limited Stay Pending The Resolution Of Yahoo!'s Petition For Writ Of Mandamus To The Federal Circuit by Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer)
June 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 369 MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER concerning the claim construction issues. The court adopts the constructions set forth in this opinion for the disputed terms of the 947 patent. The parties are ordered that they may not refer, directly or indirectly, to each others claim construction positions in the presence of the jury. Likewise, the parties are ordered to refrain from mentioning any portion of this opinion, other than the actual definitions adopted by the court, in the presence of the jury. Any reference to claim construction proceedings is limited to informing the jury of the definitions adopted by the court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/18/10. (ehs, )
June 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 368 ORDER - Within seven days of this order, the plaintiff shall submit a protective order that contains the following text in paragraphs 6a and 8a: Outside litigation counsel of record and supporting personnel employed in the law firm(s) of outside litigation counsel of record, such as attorneys, paralegals, legal translators, legal secretaries, legal clerks and shorthand reporters (With the exception that such information shall not be available to David Pridham, employees of the Law Office of David Pridham and employees under David Pridhams direction or control without express permission of the Court). Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/18/10. (ehs, )
June 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 367 ORDER denying 363 Motion for partial reconsideration of the order compelling production of the Click Protection System source code. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/18/10. (ehs, )
June 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 366 ORDER denying 364 Motion to Stay discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/18/10. (ehs, )
June 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 365 RESPONSE in Opposition re 364 MOTION to Stay Discovery Ordered In Docket Number 355 Until An Amended Protective Order Is Entered And Pending The Resolution Of Yahoo!'s Motion For Partial Reconsideration filed by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Liz Wiley, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B)(Wiley, Elizabeth)
June 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 364 MOTION to Stay Discovery Ordered In Docket Number 355 Until An Amended Protective Order Is Entered And Pending The Resolution Of Yahoo!'s Motion For Partial Reconsideration by Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer)
June 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 363 SEALED MOTION For Partial Reconsideration of Docket Number 355 Regarding Production of The Click Protection Source Code by Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Declaration of Jason White, # 4 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Jason White, # 5 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Jason White, # 6 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Jason White, # 7 Declaration of Chi-Chao Chang)(Doan, Jennifer)
June 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 362 RESPONSE in Opposition re 356 Opposed MOTION to Amend/Correct Protective Order filed by Yahoo!, Inc.. (Doan, Jennifer)
June 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 361 SEALED MOTION To Compel Google Inc. To Produce Ad Spam Filtering Source Code And Related Witnesses by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Andrew D. Weiss, # 2 Exhibit A to Weiss Decl., # 3 Exhibit B to Weiss Decl., # 4 Exhibit C to Weiss Decl., # 5 Exhibit D to Weiss Decl., # 6 Exhibit E to Weiss Decl., # 7 Exhibit F to Weiss Decl., # 8 Exhibit G to Weiss Decl., # 9 Exhibit H to Weiss Decl., # 10 Exhibit I to Weiss Decl., # 11 Text of Proposed Order)(Weiss, Andrew)
June 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 360 NOTICE by Bright Response LLC of Filing Letter Brief of David Pridham in Support of Bright Response, LLC's Opposed Motion at Docket Number 356 (Attachments: # 1 Attachment)(Pridham, David)
June 10, 2010 Opinion or Order ***FILED IN ERROR. NEED TO FILE NOTICE AND ATTACH THE LETTER AS AS ATTACHMENT Document # 359, Notice. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
June 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 359 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE.*** Notice by Bright Response LLC (Letter Brief of David Pridham in support of Bright Response Dkt No. 356) (Pridham, David) Modified on 6/10/2010 (ch, ).
June 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 358 NOTICE by AOL, LLC., Google Inc. re 357 MOTION for Entry of Amended Protective Order Notice of Joinder in Defendant Yahoo!'s Motion for Entry of Amended Protective Order (Perlson, David)
June 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 357 MOTION for Entry of Amended Protective Order by Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Doan, Jennifer) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/10/2010: # 6 Text of Proposed Order) (ch, ).
June 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 356 Opposed MOTION to Amend/Correct Protective Order by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Spangler Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I)(Spangler, Andrew) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/15/2010: # 11 Text of Proposed Order) (ch, ).
June 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 355 ORDER granting 322 Sealed Motion Emergency Supplemental Brief in support of its motion to compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/8/2010. (ch, )
June 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 354 ORDER denying 252 Sealed Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/8/2010. (ch, )
June 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 353 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 322 SEALED MOTION Emergency Supplemental Brief in Support of January 25, 2010 Motion to Compel Yahoo! Inc. to Comply with Court Order of November 5, 2009 and Produce Source Code in Native Format (Yahoo! Inc.'s Sur-Reply to Bright Response, LLC's Emergency Supplemental Brief in Support of January 25, 2010 Motion to Compel Yahoo! Inc. to Comply with Court Order of November 5, 2009 and Produce Source Code in Native Format as Maintained in the Ordinary Course of Business) filed by Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit F)(Doan, Jennifer)
June 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 352 ORDER granting 351 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Todd Y Brandt terminated as counsel for Bright Response LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/4/2010. (ch, )
June 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 351 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brandt, Todd)
June 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 350 ORDER SCHEDULING MEDIATION CONFERENCE, (Mediation Conference set for 6/28/2010 10:00 AM in Ctrm 403 (Texarkana) before Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven.). Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 6/3/2010. (sm, )
June 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 349 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 288 Sealed Motion to Amend the Protective Order. The parties shall jointly submit an amended protective order within seven days that complies with the rulings in this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/2/2010. (ch, )
June 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 348 AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER - Motions due by 7/19/2010., Proposed Pretrial Order due by 7/9/2010., Jury Selection set for 8/2/2010 09:00AM before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham., Jury Trial set for 8/2/2010 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham., Pretrial Conference set for 7/28/2010 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/1/10. (ehs, )
June 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 347 ORDER granting 342 Motion for Leave to Amend and serve their Invalidity Contentions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/1/10. (ehs, )
May 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 346 SEALED RESPONSE by Bright Response LLC to 324 Sealed Document (Reply to Yahoo!'s Amended Counterclaims) filed by Bright Response LLC. (Weiss, Andrew)
May 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 345 SEALED RESPONSE by Bright Response LLC to 330 Sealed Document (Reply to AOL's Amended Counterclaims) filed by Bright Response LLC. (Weiss, Andrew)
May 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 344 SEALED RESPONSE by Bright Response LLC to 329 Sealed Document (Reply to Google's Amended Counterclaims) filed by Bright Response LLC. (Weiss, Andrew)
May 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 343 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 115 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings,, by AOL, LLC., America Online, Inc., Bright Response LLC, Google Inc., Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Jennifer)
May 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 342 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to Amend Their Invalidity Contentions by AOL, LLC., Google Inc., Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer)
May 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 341 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 322 SEALED MOTION Emergency Supplemental Brief in Support of January 25, 2010 Motion to Compel Yahoo! Inc. to Comply with Court Order of November 5, 2009 and Produce Source Code in Native Format filed by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Liz Wiley, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E)(Wiley, Elizabeth)
May 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 340 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediator Judge Caroline Craven. Mediation deadline is 6/30/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 5/28/2010. (ch, )
May 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 339 RESPONSE in Opposition re 322 SEALED MOTION Emergency Supplemental Brief in Support of January 25, 2010 Motion to Compel Yahoo! Inc. to Comply with Court Order of November 5, 2009 and Produce Source Code in Native Format filed by Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Scott Sherwin, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Declaration of Jennifer Doan, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4)(Doan, Jennifer)
May 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 338 ORDER granting 327 Motion for Leave to File Amended Answer and Counterclaims. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 5/20/2010. (ch, )
May 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 337 ORDER denying 301 Unopposed Motion to Continue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 5/20/2010. (ch, )
May 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 336 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Scott D Sherwin on behalf of Yahoo!, Inc. (Sherwin, Scott)
May 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 335 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mansi H. Shah on behalf of Yahoo!, Inc. (Shah, Mansi)
May 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 334 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 288 Emergency SEALED MOTION (Expedited Motion to Amend Protective Order)Emergency SEALED MOTION (Expedited Motion to Amend Protective Order) filed by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Elizabeth Wiley, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Affidavit Declaration of David Pridham)(Wiley, Elizabeth)
May 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 333 Additional Attachments to Main Document: 326 Sealed Additional Attachments to Main Document, 330 Sealed Document, 329 Sealed Document, 328 Sealed Additional Attachments to Main Document.. (Roberts, Andrea)
May 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 332 ORDER granting 325 Motion for Leave to File Amended Answer and Counterclaims. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 5/12/2010. (ch, )
May 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 331 ORDER granting 323 Motion for Leave to File Amended Answer and Counterclaims. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 5/12/2010. (ch, )
May 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 330 Sealed Document - Dfts AOL LLC's and America Online Inc's Amended Answer and Counterclaims (Perlson, David) Modified on 5/12/2010 (ch, ).
May 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 329 Sealed Document - Dft Google Inc. Amended Answer and Counterclaims to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. (Perlson, David) Modified on 5/12/2010 (ch, ).
May 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 328 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 327 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer and Counterclaims. (Perlson, David)
May 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 327 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer and Counterclaims by AOL, LLC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
May 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 326 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 325 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer and Counterclaims. (Perlson, David)
May 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 325 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer and Counterclaims by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
May 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 324 Sealed Document Yahoo! Inc.'s Amended Answer, Affirmative Defenses, and Counterclaims to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. (Doan, Jennifer)
May 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 323 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer by Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer)
May 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 322 SEALED MOTION Emergency Supplemental Brief in Support of January 25, 2010 Motion to Compel Yahoo! Inc. to Comply with Court Order of November 5, 2009 and Produce Source Code in Native Format by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Elizabeth Wiley, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Text of Proposed Order)(Wiley, Elizabeth)
May 7, 2010 Opinion or Order ***FILED IN ERROR. FILED UNDER WRONG EVENT. Document # 321, Sealed Document. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
May 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 321 ***FILED IN ERROR. WRONG EVENT. PLEASE IGNORE.***Sealed Document. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Elizabeth Wiley, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Text of Proposed Order)(Wiley, Elizabeth) Modified on 5/7/2010 (ch, ).
May 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 320 ORDER granting 318 Motion for Extension of Time to File; granting 318 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply ( Responses due by 5/12/2010). Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 5/6/10. (ehs, )
May 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 319 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Todd Y Brandt on behalf of Bright Response LLC (Brandt, Todd)
May 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 318 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Sur-Reply, MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Yahoo's Expedited Motion to Amend Protective Order by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wiley, Elizabeth)
April 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 315 ORDER granting 312 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply in Support of Expedited Motion to Amend the Protective Order. Responses due by 4/26/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 4/20/10. (ehs, )
April 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 314 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of MOTION TO COMPEL HEARING held on 4/1/10 before Judge Chad Everingham. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR,Telephone number: (903) 663-5082. (31 pages)NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/14/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/24/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/22/2010. (tja, )
April 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 313 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of CLAIM CONSTRUCTION HEARING held on 4/1/10 before Judge Chad Everingham. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR,Telephone number: (903) 663-5082. (111 pages)NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/14/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/24/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/22/2010. (tja, )
April 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 312 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply in Support of Expedited Motion to Amend the Protective Order by Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer)
April 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 308 ORDER granting 307 Motion to Withdraw ; withdrawing 251 Sealed Motion filed by Bright Response shall be withdrawn without prejucie. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 4/9/10. (ehs, )
April 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 307 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw 251 Interim SEALED MOTION by Bright Response, LLC to Compel Google Inc. to Produce Complete Source Code for all Accused Instrumentalities by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Spangler, Andrew)
April 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 305 RESPONSE in Opposition re 288 Emergency SEALED MOTION (Expedited Motion to Amend Protective Order)Emergency SEALED MOTION (Expedited Motion to Amend Protective Order) filed by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Affidavit)(Wiley, Elizabeth)
April 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 306 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham: Markman Hearing held on 4/1/2010, Motion Hearing held on 4/1/2010 re 251 Interim SEALED MOTION by Bright Response, LLC to Compel Google Inc. to Produce Complete Source Code for all Accused Instrumentalities filed by Bright Response LLC, 252 SEALED MOTION to Compel Yahoo! Inc. to Comply with Court Order of November 5, 2009 and Produce Source Code in Native Format as Maintained in Ordinary Course of Business filed by Bright Response LLC. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign-in Sheet) (jml)
March 31, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 304 AMENDED JOINT CLAIM CONSTRUCTION CHART filed by AOL, LLC., America Online, Inc., Bright Response LLC, Google Inc., Yahoo!, Inc.. (Doan, Jennifer)
March 31, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 303 Defendants' Sealed Supplement to the Record on Claim Construction. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Perlson, David)
March 31, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 302 RESPONSE in Opposition re 301 MOTION (Request Regarding Trial Date) filed by Bright Response LLC. (Anderson, Patrick)
March 31, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 301 MOTION (Request Regarding Trial Date) by AOL, LLC., Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Jennifer)
March 31, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 300 ORDER granting 298 Motion for Leave to Supplement Invalidity Contentions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 3/31/2010. (ch, )
March 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 299 NOTICE of Hearing: Markman Hearing RESET for 4/1/2010, 08:30 AM, in Mag Ctrm (Marshall) before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham, with hearing on Docket Nos. 251 and 252 to follow immediately upon conclusion of the Markman. (delat)
March 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 298 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File (Supplement Invalidity Contentions) by AOL, LLC., Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Jennifer)
March 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 297 ORDER granting 258 Sealed Motion for leave to Serve Supplemental Infringement Contentions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 3/24/2010. (ch, )
March 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 296 BRIGHT RESPONSE, LLC'S CLAIM CONSTRUCTION CHART filed by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Fenster, Marc)
March 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 295 DEFENDANTS' P.R. 4-5(d) CLAIM CONSTRUCTION CHART filed by AOL, LLC., America Online, Inc., Google Inc., Yahoo!, Inc.. (Perlson, David)
March 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 294 ORDER granting 293 Motion for Extension of Time to File Joint Claim Construction Chart. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 3/22/10. (ehs, )
March 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 293 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File P.R. 4-5(d) Claim Construction Chart by AOL, LLC., America Online, Inc., Google Inc., Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
March 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 292 ORDER granting 289 Motion for Extension of Time to File Joint Claim Construction Chart. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 3/19/2010. (ch, )
March 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 291 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 258 SEALED MOTION for Leave to Supplement Infringement Contentions as to Defendant Yahoo, Inc. filed by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Elizabeth Wiley)(Wiley, Elizabeth)
March 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 290 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 252 SEALED MOTION to Compel Yahoo! Inc. to Comply with Court Order of November 5, 2009 and Produce Source Code in Native Format as Maintained in Ordinary Course of Business, 251 Interim SEALED MOTION by Bright Response, LLC to Compel Google Inc. to Produce Complete Source Code for all Accused Instrumentalities : Motion Hearing set for 4/1/2010 01:30 PM in Mag Ctrm (Marshall) before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham. (jml)
March 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 289 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File P.R. 4-5(d) Joint Claim Construction Order by AOL, LLC., America Online, Inc., Google Inc., Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
March 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 288 Emergency SEALED MOTION (Expedited Motion to Amend Protective Order) by Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit 1, # 5 Exhibit 2, # 6 Exhibit 3, # 7 Exhibit 4, # 8 Exhibit 5, # 9 Exhibit 6, # 10 Exhibit 7, # 11 Exhibit 8, # 12 Exhibit 9, # 13 Exhibit 10, # 14 Exhibit 11, # 15 Exhibit 12, # 16 Exhibit 13)(Doan, Jennifer)
March 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 287 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham: Hotline Conference held on 3/15/2010. (Jan Lockhart, ECRO.) (jml)
March 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 286 NOTICE Resetting Hearing: Markman Hearing set for 4/1/2010 09:00 AM in Mag Ctrm (Marshall) before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham. (jml)
March 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 285 REPLY BRIEF REGARDING CLAIM CONSTRUCTION IN SUPPORT OF 253 Claim Construction Brief filed by Bright Response LLC. (Fenster, Marc)
March 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 284 SEALED MOTION for Expedited Consideration and Oral Hearing on Motion to Compel Yahoo! Inc.to Comply with Court Order (Dkt 252) by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Elizabeth Wiley, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Wiley, Elizabeth)
March 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 283 Unopposed MOTION for Hearing for Expedited Oral Hearing on Motion to Compel by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wiley, Elizabeth)
March 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 282 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 258 SEALED MOTION for Leave to Supplement Infringement Contentions as to Defendant Yahoo, Inc. filed by Yahoo!, Inc.. (Defendant Yahoo! Inc.'s Response to Bright Response, LLC's Motion for Leave to Supplement its Infringement Contentions as to Defendant Yahoo! Inc.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Doan, Jennifer)
March 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 281 SEALED SURREPLY to Motion re 251 Interim SEALED MOTION by Bright Response, LLC to Compel Google Inc. to Produce Complete Source Code for all Accused Instrumentalities filed by Google Inc.. (Perlson, David)
March 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 280 ORDER granting 279 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 258 SEALED MOTION for Leave to Supplement Infringement Contentions as to Defendant Yahoo, Inc. Responses due by 3/5/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 3/5/2010. (ch, )
March 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 279 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Supplement Infringement Contentions as to Yahoo!, Inc. by Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Thane, Joshua)
March 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 278 ORDER granting 274 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Debera Wells Hepburn terminated as counsel for Bright Response LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 3/1/2010. (ch, )
March 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 277 ORDER granting 276 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 258 SEALED MOTION for Leave to Supplement Infringement Contentions as to Defendant Yahoo, Inc. Responses due by 3/4/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 3/1/2010. (ch, )
February 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 276 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Supplement Infringement Contentions as to Yahoo!, Inc. by Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Thane, Joshua)
February 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 275 RESPONSE to 253 Claim Construction Brief by AOL, LLC., America Online, Inc., Google Inc., Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Todd Kennedy, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, part 1, # 7 Exhibit 5, part 2, # 8 Exhibit 5, part 3, # 9 Exhibit 5, part 4, # 10 Exhibit 6, # 11 Exhibit 7, # 12 Exhibit 8, part 1, # 13 Exhibit 8, part 2, # 14 Exhibit 9, # 15 Exhibit 10)(Perlson, David)
February 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 274 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hepburn, Debera)
February 26, 2010 Opinion or Order ***FILED IN ERROR. FILED UNDER WRONG EVENT Document # 272, Motion. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
February 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 273 Additional Attachments to Main Document: 272 MOTION Defendants' Joint Response Brief on Claim Construction.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, part 1, # 6 Exhibit 5, part 2, # 7 Exhibit 5, part 3, # 8 Exhibit 5, part 4, # 9 Exhibit 6, # 10 Exhibit 7, # 11 Exhibit 8, part 1, # 12 Errata 8, part 2, # 13 Exhibit 9, # 14 Exhibit 10)(Perlson, David)
February 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 272 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE.*** MOTION Defendants' Joint Response Brief on Claim Construction by AOL, LLC., Google Inc., Yahoo!, Inc.. (Perlson, David) Modified on 2/26/2010 (ch, ).
February 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 271 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 251 Interim SEALED MOTION by Bright Response, LLC to Compel Google Inc. to Produce Complete Source Code for all Accused Instrumentalities filed by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Elizabeth Wiley, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D)(Wiley, Elizabeth)
February 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 270 ORDER granting 269 Motion for Extension of Time to File Claim ConstructionBriefs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 2/25/10. (ehs, )
February 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 269 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Claim Construction Briefs by AOL, LLC., America Online, Inc., Bright Response LLC, Google Inc., Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
February 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 268 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney William C Rooklidge for Yahoo!, Inc. (RECEIPT 5-1-1873). (rml, )
February 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 267 ORDER granting 265 Motion for Extension of Time to File Claim Construction Briefs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 2/24/10. (ehs, )
February 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 266 ORDER granting 264 Motion for Extension of Time to File Claim Construction Briefs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 2/24/10. (ehs, )
February 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 265 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Claim Construction Briefs by AOL, LLC., America Online, Inc., Google Inc., Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
February 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 264 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Claim Construction Briefs by AOL, LLC., America Online, Inc., Google Inc., Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
February 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 263 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 252 SEALED MOTION to Compel Yahoo! Inc. to Comply with Court Order of November 5, 2009 and Produce Source Code in Native Format as Maintained in Ordinary Course of Business filed by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Elizabeth Wiley, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Affidavit of Patrick Anderson)(Wiley, Elizabeth)
February 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 262 ORDER granting 261 Motion for Extension of Time to File Claim Construction Briefing. 1) Defendants are to comply with P.R. 4-5(b), their Claim Construction Opposition Brief by February 22, 2010. 2) Plaintiff Bright Response is to comply with P.R. 4-5(c), its Claim Construction Reply Brief Reply, by March 8, 2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 2/22/10. (ehs, )
February 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 261 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Claim Construction Briefing by AOL, LLC., America Online, Inc., Google Inc., Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Jennifer)
February 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 260 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 251 Interim SEALED MOTION by Bright Response, LLC to Compel Google Inc. to Produce Complete Source Code for all Accused Instrumentalities filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Jennifer P. Ainsworth, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
February 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 259 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 258 SEALED MOTION for Leave to Supplement Infringement Contentions as to Defendant Yahoo, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit D, # 2 Exhibit E, # 3 Exhibit F, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Wiley, Elizabeth)
February 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 258 SEALED MOTION for Leave to Supplement Infringement Contentions as to Defendant Yahoo, Inc. by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Affidavit, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C)(Wiley, Elizabeth)
February 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 257 ORDER granting 252 Sealed Motion to Extend Time to File its Response to Bright Responses Motion to Compel Google Inc. to Produce Complete Source Code for all Accused Instrumentalities (Motion to Compel) [Dkt #251]. Deadline extended to 2/15/10. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 2/12/10. (ehs, )
February 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 256 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 252 SEALED MOTION to Compel Yahoo! Inc. to Comply with Court Order of November 5, 2009 and Produce Source Code in Native Format as Maintained in Ordinary Course of Business filed by Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 White Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit N)(Doan, Jennifer)
February 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 255 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 251 Interim SEALED MOTION by Bright Response, LLC to Compel Google Inc. to Produce Complete Source Code for all Accused Instrumentalities by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Jennifer)
February 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 254 ORDER granting 219 Motion for Leave to File Response to Bright Responses Motion to Compel Production of Source Code. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 2/8/10. (ehs, )
February 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 253 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Thompson, Stanley)
January 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 252 SEALED MOTION to Compel Yahoo! Inc. to Comply with Court Order of November 5, 2009 and Produce Source Code in Native Format as Maintained in Ordinary Course of Business by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit N, # 16 Exhibit O, # 17 Exhibit P, # 18 Text of Proposed Order)(Wiley, Elizabeth)
January 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 251 SEALED MOTION by Bright Response, LLC to Compel Google Inc. to Produce Complete Source Code for all Accused Instrumentalities by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit N, # 16 Exhibit O, # 17 Text of Proposed Order)(Wiley, Elizabeth) Modified on 1/25/2010 (sm, ).
January 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 250 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 11/23/09 Motion Hearing before Judge Chad Everingham. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Susan Simmons, CSR,Telephone number: 903/935-3868. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 2/8/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/16/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/16/2010. (lss, )
January 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 249 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Elizabeth Stoebner Wiley on behalf of Bright Response LLC (Wiley, Elizabeth)
December 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 248 ORDER granting 247 Motion to Withdraw Motion to Compel Production of Documents and Privilege Logs from Plaintiff and Acclaim Financial Group, LLC (Dkt. #244). Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 12/28/09. (ehs, )
December 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 247 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw 244 SEALED MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND PRIVILEGE LOGS FROM PLAINTIFF AND ACCLAIM FINANCIAL GROUP LLC by AOL, LLC., America Online, Inc., Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Jennifer)
December 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 246 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alan Wayne Brooks on behalf of Bright Response LLC (Brooks, Alan)
December 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 245 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alexander Chester Giza on behalf of Bright Response LLC (Giza, Alexander)
December 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 244 ***WITHDRAWN PER ORDER # 248 *** SEALED MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND PRIVILEGE LOGS FROM PLAINTIFF AND ACCLAIM FINANCIAL GROUP LLC by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of David A. Perlson, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit N, # 16 Exhibit O, # 17 Exhibit P, # 18 Exhibit Q, # 19 Exhibit R, # 20 Exhibit S, # 21 Exhibit T, # 22 Exhibit U, # 23 Exhibit V, # 24 Exhibit W, # 25 Exhibit X, # 26 Exhibit Y, # 27 Exhibit Z, # 28 Exhibit AA, # 29 Exhibit BB, # 30 Exhibit CC, # 31 Exhibit DD, # 32 Exhibit EE, # 33 Exhibit FF, # 34 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David) Modified on 12/28/2009 (ehs, ).
November 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 243 ORDER granting 221 Motion for Leave to File; denying 222 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 12/24/09. (ehs, )
November 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 242 ORDER granting 240 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney John Frederick Bufe and Michael E Jones and Allen F Gardner terminated as counsel for Yahoo!. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 11/24/09. (ch, )
November 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 241 ORDER granting 235 Motion for leave to file Supplemental Reply to Motion to Modify the Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 11/24/09. (ch, )
November 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 240 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Michael E. Jones, John F. Bufe, Allen F. Gardner and the Potter Minton, P.C. law firm as counsel by Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
November 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 239 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham: Motion Hearing held on 11/23/2009 re 222 MOTION for Protective Order Modification filed by Yahoo!, Inc., 221 MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Modify Protective Order filed by Yahoo!, Inc.. (Jan Lockhart, ECRO.) (Attachments: # 1 Sign-in Sheet) (jml)
November 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 238 Additional Attachments to Main Document: 237 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion,.. (White, Jason)
November 23, 2009 Opinion or Order NOTICE FROM CLERK re 235 Unopposed SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Brief. This entry has been modified by clerk, per attys request, to be an unsealed motion. (sm, )
November 23, 2009 Opinion or Order ***FILED IN ERROR, PER ATTY (ATTY HAS REFILED - SEE #237). Document # 236, Sealed Supplemental Surreply. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (sm, )
November 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 237 ***REPLACES #236***SEALED SUPPLEMENTAL SUR-REPLY to Response to Motion re 222 MOTION for Protective Order Modification filed by Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit White, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Affidavit Zent)(White, Jason) Modified on 11/23/2009 (sm, ).
November 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 236 ***FILED IN ERROR, PER ATTY, PLEASE IGNORE.***SEALED SUPPLEMENTAL SUR-REPLY to Response to Motion re 222 MOTION for Protective Order Modification filed by Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit White, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Affidavit Zent)(White, Jason) Modified on 11/23/2009 (sm, ).
November 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 235 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Brief (unsealed per atty's request) by Yahoo!, Inc.. (White, Jason) Modified on 11/23/2009 (sm, ).
November 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 234 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Alison E Monahan for Google Inc. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-1-5042. (ch, )
November 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 233 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Scott Andrews on behalf of Yahoo!, Inc. (Andrews, John)
November 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 232 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joshua Reed Thane on behalf of Yahoo!, Inc. (Thane, Joshua)
November 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 231 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jennifer Haltom Doan on behalf of Yahoo!, Inc. (Doan, Jennifer)
November 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 230 ORDER - the court orders Yahoo to comply with the protective order currently in place (Dkt. No. 134), and specifically Section 10(c), which states in part, The Producing Party shall make available a laser printer with commercially reasonable printing speeds for on-site printing during inspecti of the code. The court will address Yahoos motion for protective order modification (Dkt. No. 222) at a later date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 11/18/09. (ch, )
November 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 229 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of MOTION TO COMPEL Hearing held on 11/5/09 before Judge Chad Everingham. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR,Telephone number: (903) 663-5082. (24 pgs.)NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/9/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/21/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/16/2010. (tja, )
November 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 228 NOTICE of Hearing: Hearing on Yahoo! Inc.'s Motion to Modify the Protective Order (Dkt. #222) set for 11/23/2009, 09:30 AM, in Mag Ctrm (Marshall) before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham.(delat)
November 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 227 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 222 MOTION for Protective Order Modification filed by Bright Response LLC. (Weiss, Andrew)
November 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 226 REPLY to Response to Motion re 222 MOTION for Protective Order Modification filed by Yahoo!, Inc.. (White, Jason)
November 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 225 NOTICE by Bright Response LLC re 224 Response in Opposition to Motion, of Emergency Request for Hearing, If Necessary (Weiss, Andrew)
November 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 224 RESPONSE in Opposition re 222 MOTION for Protective Order Modification AND REQUEST FOR EMERGENCY HEARING, IF NECESSARY filed by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Andrew D. Weiss, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C)(Weiss, Andrew)
November 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 223 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham: Motion Hearing held on 11/5/2009 re 195 SEALED MOTION to Compel Production of Source Code filed by Bright Response LLC. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR.) (Attachments: # 1 Sign-in Sheet) (jml)
November 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 222 MOTION for Protective Order Modification by Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit White Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(White, Jason)
November 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 221 MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Modify Protective Order by Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(White, Jason)
November 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 220 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 195 SEALED MOTION to Compel Production of Source Code per 219 filed by Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10)(White, Jason)
November 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 219 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply by Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(White, Jason)
November 4, 2009 Opinion or Order ***FILED IN ERROR. FILED IN WRONG CASE Document # 218, Motion for leave. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (Attorney will refile)(ch, )
November 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 218 ***FILED IN ERROR. WRONG CASE. PLEASE IGNORE.*** MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply by Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(White, Jason) Modified on 11/4/2009 (ch, ).
November 4, 2009 Opinion or Order ***FILED IN ERROR. FILE UNDER WRONG EVENT Document # 217, Sur-Reply to Reply. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (Attorney must refile using the correct event)(ch, )
November 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 217 ***FILED IN ERROR. FILED USING WRONG EVENT. PLEASE IGNORE.***SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 195 SEALED MOTION to Compel Production of Source Code filed by Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Affidavit, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6, # 9 Exhibit 7, # 10 Exhibit 8, # 11 Exhibit 9, # 12 Exhibit 10, # 13 Text of Proposed Order)(White, Jason) Modified on 11/4/2009 (ch, ).
October 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 216 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrew D Weiss on behalf of Bright Response LLC (Weiss, Andrew)
October 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 215 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 195 SEALED MOTION to Compel Production of Source Code : Motion Hearing set for 11/5/2009 02:00 PM in Mag Ctrm (Marshall) before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham. (jml)
October 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ORDER granting 213 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Ari Benjamin Rafilson terminated as counsel for pltf. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 10/19/09. (ehs, )
October 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 213 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Ari Rafilson) by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Rafilson, Ari)
October 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 212 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Debera Wells Hepburn on behalf of Bright Response LLC (Hepburn, Debera)
September 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 211 NOTICE of Designation of Attorney in Charge to David A Perlson on behalf of AOL, LLC., America Online, Inc., Google Inc. (Perlson, David)
September 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 210 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 164 Motion for Protective Order. Ruling set forth herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 9/29/09. (ehs, )
September 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 209 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 195 SEALED MOTION to Compel Production of Source Code filed by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Rafilson, Ari)
September 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 208 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 194 SEALED MOTION for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions re Google Inc. filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Perlson, David)
September 28, 2009 Opinion or Order ***FILED IN ERROR, WRONG EVENT USED, ATTY MUST REFILE USING CORRECT EVENT. Document # 204, Sealed Document. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (sm, )
September 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 207 ORDER granting 194 Sealed Motion to supplement its infringement contentions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 9/28/09. (ehs, )
September 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 206 ORDER granting 205 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. The deadline for compliance with Patent Rule 4.4 shall be extended until November 27, 2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 9/28/09. (ehs, )
September 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 205 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery pursuant to Patent Rule 4.4 by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
September 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE.***Sealed Document. GOOGLE INC.'S SUR-REPLY IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT ITS INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Perlson, David) Modified on 9/28/2009 (sm, ).
September 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 203 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 195 SEALED MOTION to Compel Production of Source Code filed by Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(White, Jason)
September 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 202 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 194 SEALED MOTION for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions re Google Inc. filed by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Rafilson Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C)(Bustamante, John)
September 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 201 NOTICE by Bright Response LLC PR 4-3 Submission of the Parties (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex. A)(Thompson, Stanley)
September 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 200 ORDER granting 199 Motion for Extension of Time to File the Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement under P.R. 4-3. Deadline for Plaintiff and Defendants to file the Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement under P.R. 4-3 shall be extended until and through September 11, 2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 9/11/09. (ehs, )
September 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 199 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement Under P.R. 4-3 by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sistos, Antonio)
September 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER granting 197 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Parties will have through September 9, 2009 to comply with P.R. 4-3. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 9/9/09. (ehs, )
September 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 197 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File to Comply with PR 4-3 by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Thompson, Stanley)
September 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 196 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 194 SEALED MOTION for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions re Google Inc. filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-1, # 2 Exhibit A-2, # 3 Exhibit B-1, # 4 Exhibit B-2, # 5 Exhibit B-3, # 6 Exhibit B-4, # 7 Exhibit C, # 8 Exhibit D, # 9 Exhibit E, # 10 Exhibit F-1, # 11 Exhibit F-2, # 12 Exhibit F-3, # 13 Exhibit F-4, # 14 Exhibit G, # 15 Exhibit H, # 16 Exhibit I, # 17 Exhibit J, # 18 Exhibit K, # 19 Exhibit L, # 20 Exhibit M, # 21 Exhibit N, # 22 Exhibit O, # 23 Exhibit P, # 24 Exhibit Q, # 25 Exhibit R, # 26 Exhibit S, # 27 Exhibit T, # 28 Exhibit U, # 29 Exhibit V)(Perlson, David)
September 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 195 SEALED MOTION to Compel Production of Source Code by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of Ari Rafilson, # 2 Exhibit A-1, # 3 Exhibit A-2, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G, # 10 Exhibit H, # 11 Exhibit I, # 12 Exhibit J, # 13 Exhibit K, # 14 Exhibit L, # 15 Exhibit M, # 16 Exhibit N, # 17 Exhibit O, # 18 Exhibit P, # 19 Exhibit Q, # 20 Exhibit R, # 21 Text of Proposed Order)(Rafilson, Ari)
August 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 194 SEALED MOTION for Leave to Supplement Infringement Contentions re Google Inc. by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Text of Proposed Order)(Rafilson, Ari) Modified on 8/18/2009 (rml, ).
August 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER granting 192 Agreed Motion to Withdraw 185 SEALED MOTION To Quash And For Protective Order To Preclude Depositions of Google's High-Level Executives filed by Google Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on August 13, 2009. (jml)
August 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 192 Agreed MOTION to Withdraw 185 SEALED MOTION To Quash And For Protective Order To Preclude Depositions of Google's High-Level Executives by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
August 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ORDER granting 190 Motion for Extension to Comply with P.R. 4-3. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on August 12, 2009. (jml)
August 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 190 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File - To Comply with PR 4-3 by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fenster, Marc)
August 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 189 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Marcus Bustamante on behalf of Bright Response LLC (Bustamante, John)
July 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER granting 186 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Parties will have through August 6, 2009 to comply with P.R. 4-3.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/31/09. (ehs, )
July 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 187 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Rachel H Smith for Google Inc..(APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-1-4844) (ehs, )
July 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 186 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Spangler, Andrew)
July 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 185 SEALED MOTION To Quash And For Protective Order To Preclude Depositions of Google's High-Level Executives by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of David A. Perlson, # 2 Ex. 1 to Perlson Declaration, # 3 Exhibit Ex. 2 to Perlson Declaration, # 4 Exhibit Ex. 3 to Perlson Declaration, # 5 Exhibit Ex. 4 to Perlson Declaration, # 6 Exhibit Ex. 5 to Perlson Declaration, # 7 Exhibit Ex. 6 to Perlson Declaration, # 8 Exhibit Ex. 7 to Perlson Declaration, # 9 Exhibit Ex. 8 to Perlson Declaration, # 10 Exhibit Ex. 9 to Perlson Declaration, # 11 Exhibit Ex. 10 to Perlson Declaration, # 12 Exhibit Ex. 11 to Perlson Declaration, # 13 Exhibit Ex. 12 to Perlson Declaration, # 14 Exhibit Ex. 13 to Perlson Declaration, # 15 Exhibit Ex. 14 to Perlson Declaration, # 16 Exhibit Ex. 15 to Perlson Declaration, # 17 Exhibit Ex. 16 to Perlson Declaration, # 18 Exhibit Ex. 17 to Perlson Declaration, # 19 Exhibit Ex. 18 to Perlson Declaration, # 20 Exhibit Ex. 19 to Perlson Declaration, # 21 Exhibit Ex. 20 to Perlson Declaration, # 22 Exhibit Ex. 21 to Perlson Declaration, # 23 Exhibit Ex. 22 to Perlson Declaration, # 24 Exhibit Ex. 23 to Perlson Declaration, # 25 Exhibit Ex. 24 to Perlson Declaration, # 26 Exhibit Ex. 25 to Perlson Declaration, # 27 Exhibit Ex. 26 to Perlson Declaration, # 28 Exhibit Declaration of Marissa Mayer, # 29 Exhibit Ex. A to Mayer Declaration, # 30 Exhibit Declaration of Udi Manber, # 31 Exhibit Declaration of Doug Garland, # 32 Exhibit Declaration of Salar Kamangar, # 33 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
July 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ORDER granting 156 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney David A Perlson for America Online, Inc.. Attorney C.J. Alice Chuang; Michael J Sacksteder; Saina Shamilov; Darryl M Woo; Tyler Alexander Baker and Eric Ball terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/15/09. (ehs, )
July 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 183 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Stanley H Thompson, Jr for Bright Response LLC. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-1-4804 (ch, )
July 9, 2009 Opinion or Order ***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 182, Notice of Attorney Appearance. PLEASE IGNORE. ATTORNEY MUST FILE A PHV*** (ljw, )
July 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 182 PLEASE IGNORE, ATTORNEY IS NOT ADMITTED IN THE EASTERN DISTRICT, MUST FILE A PHV APPLICATION NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stanley H Thompson, Jr on behalf of Bright Response LLC (Thompson, Stanley) Modified on 7/9/2009 (ljw, ).
June 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 181 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Marc A Fenster on behalf of Bright Response LLC (Fenster, Marc)
June 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 180 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ari Benjamin Rafilson on behalf of Bright Response LLC (Rafilson, Ari)
June 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER granting 178 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney John J Edmonds terminated as counsel for the Plaintiffs Bright Response LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/8/09. (ch, )
June 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 178 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (John Edmonds) by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Edmonds, John)
May 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER granting 175 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jamena Scott-Pirone terminated as counsel for Google Inc and AOL LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 5/20/09. (ehs, )
May 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 176 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Britt H Evangelist for Google Inc. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-1-4694. (ch, )
May 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 175 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Jamena Scott-Pirone) by AOL, LLC., Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Jennifer)
May 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 174 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Eugene Novikov for Google Inc. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-1-4685. (ch, )
January 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 173 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 164 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Bright Response LLC. (Edmonds, John)
December 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER granting 169 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jonathan T Suder; Karolyne Hu Cheng and Michael T Cooke terminated as counsel for Bright Response LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 12/19/08. (ch, )
December 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER granting 168 Motion for Extension of Time to File. 1) Defendant Googles Reply brief regarding the Motion for Protective Order is to be filed by December 18, 2008. 2) Plaintiff Bright Responses Sur-Reply brief regarding the Motion for Protective Order is to be filed by January 2, 2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 12/19/08. (ch, )
December 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 170 RESPONSE in Support re 164 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Google Inc.. (Perlson, David)
December 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 169 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Spangler, Andrew)
December 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 168 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File (Joint Motion to Extend Deadlines Regarding Google's Motion for Protective Order [Dkt #164] by Bright Response LLC, Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Jennifer)
December 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 167 RESPONSE in Opposition re 164 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Edmonds, John)
December 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER granting 165 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Google, Inc.s Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 12/4/08. (ehs, )
December 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 165 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 164 MOTION for Protective Order by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Edmonds, John)
November 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 164 MOTION for Protective Order by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Jennifer)
October 27, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 163 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney David Taylor Rudolph for AOL, LLC. and America Online, Inc. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 2-1-4188. (ch, )
October 27, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 162 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Brian C Cannon for Google Inc.. (APPROVED FEE PAID 2-1-4181)(ehs, )
October 27, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 161 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Andrea Pallios Roberts for Google Inc..(APPROVED FEE PAID 2-1-4181) (ehs, )
October 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER granting 159 Motion to modify the style of this case. Clerk shall take note that the style of this case is now: "Bright Response, LLC vs Google, Inc. et al". Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 10/2/08. (ehs, )
September 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 159 Consent MOTION Modify Case Style by Polaris IP, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Edmonds, John)
September 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER denying 37 Motion to Dismiss; denying 39 Motion to Dismiss; denying 40 Motion to Dismiss; denying 41 Motion for More Definite Statement; denying 42 Motion for More Definite Statement; denying 43 Motion for More Definite Statement; denying 43 Motion to Stay; denying 43 Motion to Strike. For the reasons stated herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 9/23/08. (ch, )
September 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER granting 149 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Harry Lee Gillam, Jr terminated as counsel for Dft AOL, LLC., and America Online, Inc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 9/22/08. (ch, )
September 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 156 Consent MOTION to Substitute Attorney by AOL, LLC., America Online, Inc., Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Jennifer)
September 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 155 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jennifer Parker Ainsworth on behalf of AOL, LLC., America Online, Inc. (Ainsworth, Jennifer)
September 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 154 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Charles K Verhoeven for AOL, LLC., Google Inc. and AOL, LLC..(FEE PAID) 2-1-4083 (ehs, )
September 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 153 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Antonio Sistos for AOL, LLC., Google Inc. and AOL, LLC..(FEE PAID) 2-1-4079 (ehs, )
September 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 149 Consent MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by AOL, LLC., America Online, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gillam, Harry)
September 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER granting 147 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Kajeer Yar terminated as attorney of record for Polaris IP, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 9/18/08. (ch, )
September 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 147 Consent MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Polaris IP, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Yar, Kajeer)
September 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 152 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney David A Perlson for AOL, LLC. and Google Inc. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 2-1-4077. (ch, )
September 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 151 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Jennifer A Kash for AOL, LLC. and Google Inc. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 2-1-4076. (ch, )
September 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 150 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Jamena Scott-Pirone for AOL, LLC. and Google Inc. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 2-1-4075. (ch, )
September 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 146 RESPONSE to 143 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim Plaintiff's Reply to the Counterclaims of AOL, Inc. and America Online, Inc. by Polaris IP, LLC. (Cooke, Michael)
September 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 145 RESPONSE to 142 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim Plaintiff's Reply to the Counterclaims of Google, Inc. by Polaris IP, LLC. (Cooke, Michael)
September 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 144 RESPONSE to 141 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim Plaintiff's Reply to the Counterclaims of Yahoo! Inc. by Polaris IP, LLC. (Cooke, Michael)
August 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 143 Defendants AOL LLC and America Online, Inc.'s ANSWER to 129 Amended Complaint , Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against Polaris IP, LLC by AOL, LLC., America Online, Inc..(Woo, Darryl)
August 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 142 Defendant Google Inc.'s ANSWER to 129 Amended Complaint , Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against Polaris IP, LLC by Google Inc..(Woo, Darryl)
August 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 141 Defendant Yahoo Inc.'s ANSWER to 129 Amended Complaint , Affirmative Defenses, and, COUNTERCLAIM against Polaris IP, LLC by Yahoo!, Inc..(White, Jason)
August 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER granting 139 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Deadline extended to 10/14/08. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 8/19/08. (ehs, )
August 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 139 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and Allow for Amendment of the Parties' Infringement and Invalidity Contentions by AOL, LLC., America Online, Inc., Google Inc., Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Woo, Darryl)
August 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 138 NOTICE of Disclosure by AOL, LLC., America Online, Inc. of AOL, LLC's and America Online, Inc.'s P.R. 3-3 & 3-4 Disclosures (Woo, Darryl)
August 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 137 NOTICE of Disclosure by Google Inc. of Google Inc.'s P.R. 3-3 & 3-4 Disclosures (Woo, Darryl)
August 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 136 NOTICE of Disclosure by Yahoo!, Inc. of Yahoo's P.R. 3-3 & 3-4 Disclosures (White, Jason)
August 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Answer Due Deadline Updated for AOL, LLC. to 8/20/2008; America Online, Inc. to 8/20/2008; Google Inc. to 8/20/2008; Yahoo!, Inc. to 8/20/2008. (ehs, )
August 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER granting 132 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answer deadline extended to 8/20/08 for defts Google Inc., Yahoo! Inc., AOL LLC and America Online Inc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 8/5/08. (ehs, )
July 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 134 AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/30/08. (ch, )
July 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 133 Consent MOTION for Protective Order by Polaris IP, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Edmonds, John)
July 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 132 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 129 Amended Complaint or Otherwise Respond to Amended Complaint by AOL, LLC., America Online, Inc., Google Inc., Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Ball, Eric)
July 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER granting 126 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Darryl M Woo for AOL, LLC. and America Online, Inc., Michael J Sacksteder for AOL, LLC. and America Online, Inc., Tyler Alexander Baker for AOL, LLC. and America Online, Inc., Saina Shamilov for AOL, LLC. and America Online, Inc., Eric Ball for AOL, LLC. and America Online, Inc., C.J. Alice Chuang for AOL, LLC. and America Online, Inc.. Attorney Victoria Fishman Maroulis; Antonio Sistos; Kevin A Smith; Charles K Verhoeven; Matthew D Cannon and Jennifer A Kash terminated as counsel for AOL, LLC and America Online, Inc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/23/08. (ch, )
July 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER granting 127 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney J Mike Amerson and Danny Lloyd Williams terminated as counsel for Bright Response, LLC formerly known as Polaris IP, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/23/08. (ch, )
July 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 129 AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended Complaint for Patent Infringement against all defendants, filed by Polaris IP, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Edmonds, John)
July 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER granting 125 Motion to Amend Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/21/08. (ch, )
July 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 127 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR WITHDRAWAL OF REPRESENTATION) by Polaris IP, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Danny)
July 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 126 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by AOL, LLC., America Online, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Order Substituting Counsel)(Ball, Eric) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/22/2008: # 2 Revised Proposed Order) (mpv, ).
July 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 125 Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct Unopposed Motion by Plaintiff for Leave to Amend Complaint by Polaris IP, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Edmonds, John)
July 16, 2008 Opinion or Order ***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 124, Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct Unopposed Motion by Plaintiff for Leave to Amend Complaint by Polaris IP, LLC. PLEASE IGNORE. Incorrect pdf attached as Exhibit 1; attorney to correct and refile.*** (mpv, )
July 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ***FILED IN ERROR; PLEASE IGNORE***Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct Unopposed Motion by Plaintiff for Leave to Amend Complaint by Polaris IP, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 1A)(Edmonds, John) Modified on 7/16/2008 (mpv, ).
July 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 123 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Karolyne Hu Cheng on behalf of Polaris IP, LLC (Cheng, Karolyne)
July 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 122 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jonathan T Suder on behalf of Polaris IP, LLC (Suder, Jonathan)
July 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 121 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael T Cooke on behalf of Polaris IP, LLC (Cooke, Michael)
June 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER granting 119 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Kevin Patariu, Laura Beth Miller and Mircea A Tipescu terminated as counsel for Dft Yahoo!, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/30/08. (ch, )
June 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 119 Consent MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney L. Miller, K. Patariu, and M. Tipescu by Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
June 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 118 NOTICE of Change of Address by Michael Edwin Jones (Jones, Michael)
June 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER granting 116 Motion to Dismiss. All claims asserted between Plaintiff and IAC/InteractiveCorp and IAC Search and Media, Inc. are hereby dismissed with prejudice. All attorney fees and costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 6/20/08. (ch, )
June 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 116 Consent MOTION to Dismiss IAC/InteractiveCorp and IAC Search and Media, Inc. by Polaris IP, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Edmonds, John)
June 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 115 DOCKET CONTROL ORDER - Joinder of Parties due by 12/7/2008. Markman Hearing set for 3/31/2010 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham. Motions due by 6/22/2010. Pretrial Order due by 6/11/2010. Jury Selection set for 7/6/2010 09:00AM before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham. Pretrial Conference set for 6/29/2010 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/11/08. (ehs, )
June 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 114 DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/11/08. (ehs, )
June 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 113 Joint MOTION Joint Motion for Entry of Proposed Docket Control Order and Discovery Order by AOL, LLC., America Online, Inc., IAC/Interactivecorp, IAC Search and Media, Inc., Polaris IP, LLC, Google Inc., Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Docket Control Order, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Discovery Order)(Chuang, C.J. Alice)
June 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER granting 109 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Plaintiffs deadline to submit its P.R. 3-1 and 3-2 Infringement Contentions as IAC is extended until and including 6/20/08. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/9/08. (ch, )
June 9, 2008 Opinion or Order ***FILED IN ERROR. Document # #110 and #111, NOTICE by Google Inc. Discovery Order-Certificate of Service and NOTICE by Google Inc. Docket Control Order - Certificate of Service. PLEASE IGNORE. Proposed orders are not filed as separate documents. Attorney must file a motion for entry of the discovery and scheduling orders and attach the proposed orders as separate attachment. Attorney to remove the Certificate of Service page from the proposed orders before attaching them. Certificate of Service should be included with the motion*** (mpv, )
June 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ***FILED IN ERROR; PLEASE IGNORE***NOTICE by Google Inc. Docket Control Order - Certificate of Service (Chuang, C.J. Alice) Modified on 6/9/2008 (mpv, ).
June 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ***FILED IN ERROR; PLEASE IGNORE***NOTICE by Google Inc. Discovery Order-Certificate of Service (Chuang, C.J. Alice) Modified on 6/9/2008 (mpv, ).
June 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 109 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Polaris IP, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Edmonds, John)
June 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 108 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Frederick Bufe on behalf of Yahoo!, Inc. (Bufe, John)
June 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER granting 104 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Deadlines are set forth herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/2/08. (ch, )
June 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER granting 105 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The parties have until 6/6/08 to file an agreed Docket Control Order and Discovery Order with the court and that the P.R. 3-1 and 3-2 Infringement Contentions are also due on 6/6/08. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/2/08. (ch, )
May 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 105 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File an Agreed Docket Control Order and Discovery Order and for Plaintiff to Comply With P.R. 3-1 and 3.2 by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit [Proposed] Order)(Chuang, C.J. Alice)
May 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 104 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Agreed Docket Control Order and Discovery Order by Polaris IP, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Edmonds, John)
May 30, 2008 Opinion or Order ***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 103, Joint Motion. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (Attorney will refile)(ch, )
May 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ***FILED IN ERROR. ATTORNEY WILL REFILE CORRECTED DOCUMENT***Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File regarding Submission of Agreed Docket Control and Discovery Orders by AOL, LLC., America Online, Inc., IAC/Interactivecorp, IAC Search and Media, Inc., Polaris IP, LLC, Google Inc., Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael) Modified on 5/30/2008 (ch, ). Modified on 5/30/2008 (ch, ). Modified on 5/30/2008 (ch, ).
May 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 102 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Darryl M Woo on behalf of Google Inc. (Woo, Darryl)
May 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 101 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Tyler Alexander Baker on behalf of Google Inc. (Baker, Tyler)
May 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 100 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Saina Shamilov on behalf of Google Inc. (Shamilov, Saina)
May 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 99 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by C.J. Alice Chuang on behalf of Google Inc. (Chuang, C.J. Alice)
May 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 98 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric Ball on behalf of Google Inc. (Ball, Eric)
May 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER granting 96 Motion for Extension of Time to File proposed docket control order and proposed discovery order. Deadline extended to 5/30/08. Signed by Judge Charles Everingham on 5/16/08. (ehs, )
May 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 96 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Docket Control Order by Polaris IP, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Spangler, Andrew)
May 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 95 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael J Sacksteder on behalf of Google Inc. (Sacksteder, Michael)
May 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER granting 91 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Amy Elizabeth LaValle terminated as counsel for Polaris. Signed by Judge Charles Everingham on 5/1/08. (ch, )
May 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge T. John Ward and Judge Charles Everingham: Status Conference held on 5/1/08. Counsel for the parties appeared and were asked if they consented to Judge Everingham. Depending on their answer, they were then given Markman and jury selection dates for the appropriate court. The parties are to meet and confer regarding a scheduling order and discovery order, and the parties have 14 days to submit the proposed orders. Court adjourned. (Court Reporter Susan Simmons.)(delat)
May 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge T. John Ward and Judge Charles Everingham: Status Conference held on 5/01/08. Counsel for the parties appeared and were asked if they consented to Judge Everingham. Depending on their answer, they were then given Markman and jury selection dates for the appropriate court. The parties are to meet and confer regarding a scheduling order and discovery order, and the parties have 14 days to submit the proposed orders. Court adjourned. (Court Reporter Susan Simmons.) (shd, )
May 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER assigning case to Judge Everingham by consent of the parties for all further proceedings and entry of judgment. Signed by Judge Charles Everingham on 5/1/08. (ch, )
May 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 93 CONSENT to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham. (ch, )
April 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 91 Consent MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Polaris IP, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(LaValle, Amy)
April 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 90 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Patrick Rolf Anderson on behalf of Polaris IP, LLC (Anderson, Patrick)
April 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 89 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Harry Lee Gillam, Jr on behalf of AOL, LLC., America Online, Inc. (Gillam, Harry)
April 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER - This case is set for a Status Conference on May 1, 2008. In keeping with the Court's recent practice, the Court intends to give the parties an opportunity, following the conference, to reach agreements on the Docket Control Order and Discovery Order without having to return for an additional conference with the Court. Accordingly, the Court orders that disclosures under P. R. 3-1 and P. R. 3-2 are due on Friday, May 16, 2008. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 4/11/08. (ehs, )
April 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER - This case is set for a Status Conference on May 1, 2008. In keeping with the Court's recent practice, the Court intends to give the parties an opportunity, following the conference, to reach agreements on the Docket Control Order and Discovery Order without having to return for an additional conference with the Court. Accordingly, the Court orders that disclosures under P. R. 3-1 and P. R. 3-2 are due on Friday, May 16, 2008.. Signed by Judge Charles Everingham on 4/11/08 (ehs, )
April 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 86 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Matthew D Cannon for AOL, LLC. and America Online, Inc. IAC/InterActive Corp. and IAC Search and Media, Inc. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 2-1-3679 (ch, )
April 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER - The purpose of the conference will be to assign a claim construction hearing date and a trial setting. The parties shallbe prepared to inform the Court whether they will consent to trial before the Magistrate Judge. Status Conference set for 5/1/2008 10:15 AM before Judge T. John Ward. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 4/3/08. (ehs, )
April 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER granting 76 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Added attorney Charles K Verhoeven for IAC/Interactivecorp and IAC Search and Media, Inc., Jennifer A Kash for IAC/Interactivecorp,IAC Search and Media, Inc., Kevin A Smith for IAC/Interactivecorp,IAC Search and Media, Inc., Antonio Sistos for IAC/Interactivecorp,IAC Search and Media, Inc.. Attorney Michael A Jacobs terminated as counsel for IAC/InterActive Corp, and IAC Search and Media, Inc.. Signed by Judge Charles Everingham on 4/2/08. (ch, )
April 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 83 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrew Wesley Spangler on behalf of Polaris IP, LLC (Spangler, Andrew)
February 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER granting 81 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Eric M. Albritton terminated as Counsel of Record. Signed by Judge Charles Everingham on 2/26/08. (ch, )
February 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 81 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Polaris IP, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Albritton, Eric)
February 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 80 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by J Mike Amerson on behalf of Polaris IP, LLC (Amerson, J)
February 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 79 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Danny Lloyd Williams on behalf of Polaris IP, LLC (Williams, Danny)
January 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 78 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daniel Francisco Perez on behalf of Polaris IP, LLC (Perez, Daniel)
January 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 77 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Amy Elizabeth LaValle on behalf of Polaris IP, LLC (LaValle, Amy)
January 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 76 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Motion to Substitute Counsel by IAC/Interactivecorp, IAC Search and Media, Inc.. (Smith, Kevin) Additional attachment(s) Certificate of Conference and Proposed Order added on 1/29/2008 (mpv, ). Modified on 1/29/2008 (mpv, ).
January 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 75 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Kevin A Smith for AOL, LLC. and America Online, Inc. IAC/InterActiveCorp., IAC Search and Media, Inc. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 2-1-3444 (ch, )
January 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 74 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Jennifer A Kash for AOL, LLC. and America Online, Inc. IAC/InterActiveCorp., IAC Search and Media Inc. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 2-1-3444 (ch, )
January 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 73 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Antonio Sistos for AOL, LLC. and America Online, Inc. IAC/InterActive Corp., IAC Search and Media, Inc. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 2-1-3444(ch, )
January 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 72 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Charles K Verhoeven for AOL, LLC. and America Online, Inc. IAC/InterActiveCorp, IAC Search and Media, Inc.(APPROVED)(FEE PAID)2-1-3444 (ch, )
January 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER granting 70 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jason Woodard Cook terminated as plaintiffs counsel of record. Signed by Judge Charles Everingham on 1/24/08. (ch, )
January 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 70 Consent MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Polaris IP, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cook, Jason)
November 28, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER granting 65 Motion to Dismiss defts Amazon.com, Inc., A9.com, Inc. Borders, Inc and Borders Group Inc with prejudice. All attorneys' fees and costs are to be borne by the party that incurred then. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 11/28/07. (ehs, )
November 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 68 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 37 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative, for More Definite Statement, 41 MOTION for More Definite Statement by Yahoo filed by Polaris IP, LLC. (Edmonds, John)
November 23, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 67 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 43 MOTION for More Definite Statement MOTION to Stay MOTION to Strike, 40 MOTION to Dismiss the complaint by AOL filed by Polaris IP, LLC. (Edmonds, John)
November 23, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 66 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 39 MOTION to Dismiss or, In the Alternative, for a More Definite Statement; Motion to Strike, and Motion to Stay Discovery; and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof, 42 MOTION for More Definite Statement by Google filed by Polaris IP, LLC. (Edmonds, John)
November 23, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 65 Consent MOTION to Dismiss Amazon, A9 and Borders by Polaris IP, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Edmonds, John)
November 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 64 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Mircea A Tipescu for Yahoo!, Inc.. (FEE PAID) 6-1-11806 (ehs, )
November 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 63 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Kevin Patariu for Yahoo!, Inc.. (FEE PAID) 6-1-11806(ehs, )
November 15, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 62 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Yahoo!, Inc. identifying none as Corporate Parent. (White, Jason)
November 15, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 61 REPLY to Response to Motion re 37 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative, for More Definite Statement filed by Yahoo!, Inc.. (White, Jason)
November 13, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 60 REPLY to Response to Motion re 40 MOTION to Dismiss the complaint filed by AOL, LLC., America Online, Inc.. (Maroulis, Victoria)
November 13, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 59 REPLY to Response to Motion re 39 MOTION to Dismiss or, In the Alternative, for a More Definite Statement; Motion to Strike, and Motion to Stay Discovery; and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Google Inc.. (Ainsworth, Jennifer)
November 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 58 RESPONSE to 32 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of A9.com, Inc. by Polaris IP, LLC. (Cook, Jason)
November 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 57 RESPONSE to 33 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Amazon.com, Inc. by Polaris IP, LLC. (Cook, Jason)
November 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 56 RESPONSE to 34 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Borders, Inc. and Borders Group, Inc. by Polaris IP, LLC. (Cook, Jason)
November 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 55 RESPONSE to 35 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of IAC/Interactive Corp and IAC Search and Media, Inc. by Polaris IP, LLC. (Cook, Jason)
November 7, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 54 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Collin Michael Maloney on behalf of IAC/Interactivecorp, IAC Search and Media, Inc. (Maloney, Collin)
November 7, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 53 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Otis W Carroll, Jr on behalf of IAC/Interactivecorp, IAC Search and Media, Inc. (Carroll, Otis)
November 5, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 52 RESPONSE in Opposition re 43 MOTION for More Definite Statement MOTION to Stay MOTION to Strike, 40 MOTION to Dismiss the complaint filed by Polaris IP, LLC. (Edmonds, John)
November 5, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 51 RESPONSE in Opposition re 39 MOTION to Dismiss or, In the Alternative, for a More Definite Statement; Motion to Strike, and Motion to Stay Discovery; and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Polaris IP, LLC. (Edmonds, John)
November 5, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 50 RESPONSE in Opposition re 37 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative, for More Definite Statement filed by Polaris IP, LLC. (Edmonds, John)
November 2, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 49 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Google Inc. identifying none as Corporate Parent. (Ainsworth, Jennifer)
October 24, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 48 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by AOL, LLC., America Online, Inc. identifying Time Warner, Inc.; AOL Holdings, LLC; TW AOL Holdings Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Maroulis, Victoria)
October 22, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 47 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Borders Group, Inc. identifying None as Corporate Parent. (Erskine, Blake) Modified on 10/22/2007 (mpv, ).
October 22, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 46 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Borders, Inc. identifying Borders Group, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Erskine, Blake)
October 22, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 45 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Amazon.com, Inc. identifying Legg Mason Inc as Corporate Parent. (Erskine, Blake) Modified on 10/22/2007 (mpv, ).
October 22, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 44 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by A9.com, Inc. identifying Amazon.com as Corporate Parent. (Erskine, Blake)
October 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MOTION for More Definite Statement, MOTION to Stay Discovery Obligations, MOTION to Strike CONTAINED IN # 40 by AOL, LLC.. (mpv, )
October 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MOTION for More Definite Statement CONTAINED IN # 39 by Google Inc.. (mpv, )
October 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MOTION for More Definite Statement CONTAINED IN # 37 by Yahoo!, Inc.. (mpv, )
October 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MOTION to Dismiss the complaint by AOL, LLC., America Online, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Maroulis, Victoria)
October 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MOTION to Dismiss or, In the Alternative, for a More Definite Statement; Motion to Strike, and Motion to Stay Discovery; and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Jennifer)
October 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 38 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Jason C White for Yahoo!, Inc.. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 6-1-11451(ch, )
October 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative, for More Definite Statement by Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
October 18, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 36 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (NO PARENT CORPORATION) filed by IAC/Interactivecorp, IAC Search and Media, Inc. (Jacobs, Michael) Modified on 10/19/2007 (sm, ).
October 18, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Defendants IAC/InterActiveCorp's and IAC Search and Media, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and, COUNTERCLAIM against Polaris IP, LLC by IAC/Interactivecorp, IAC Search and Media, Inc..(Jacobs, Michael)
October 18, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against Polaris IP, LLC by Borders, Inc., Borders Group, Inc..(Erskine, Blake)
October 18, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against Polaris IP, LLC by Amazon.com, Inc..(Erskine, Blake)
October 18, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against Polaris IP, LLC by A9.com, Inc..(Erskine, Blake)
October 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 31 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Polaris IP, LLC. Amazon.com, Inc. served on 9/12/2007, answer due 10/18/2007. (ehs, )
October 2, 2007 Opinion or Order Answer Due Deadline Updated for Amazon.com, Inc. to 10/18/2007; A9.com, Inc. to 10/18/2007; Borders, Inc. to 10/18/2007; Borders Group, Inc. to 10/18/2007. (ch, ) Modified on 10/2/2007 (ch, ).
October 2, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting 29 Motion for Extension of Time to answer. Dft Amazon.com, A9.com Inc. Borders, Inc. and Borders Group, Inc. are extended to 10/18/07. Signed by Judge Charles Everingham on 10/2/07. (ch, )
October 1, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (Unopposed) to Plaintiff Polaris IP, LLC's Original Complaint by Amazon.com, Inc., A9.com, Inc., Borders, Inc., Borders Group, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baker, Tyler)
September 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Answer Due Deadline Updated for Yahoo!, Inc. to 10/19/2007. (ch, )
September 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting 26 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Yahoo! Inc. deadline is extended to 10/19/07 . Signed by Judge Charles Everingham on 9/19/07. (ch, )
September 18, 2007 Opinion or Order Answer Due Deadline Updated for AOL, LLC. to 10/19/2007; America Online, Inc. to 10/19/2007. (ch, )
September 18, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting 23 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Dft AOL LLC and America Online, Inc. deadline has been extended 30 days of this order . Signed by Judge Charles Everingham on 9/18/07. (ch, )
September 18, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, [Unopposed] by Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
September 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 23 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by AOL, LLC., America Online, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Maroulis, Victoria)
September 14, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 25 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Polaris IP, LLC. A9.com, Inc. served CMRR on 8/31/2007, answer due 9/20/2007. (ch, )
September 14, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 24 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Polaris IP, LLC. Borders Group, Inc. served by CMRR on 9/5/2007, answer due 9/25/2007. (ch, )
September 14, 2007 Opinion or Order Answer Due Deadline Updated for Google Inc. to 10/19/2007. (ch, )
September 14, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting 21 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Google, Inc. deadline to answer is 10/19/07 . Signed by Judge Charles Everingham on 9/14/07. (ch, )
September 11, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Jennifer)
September 7, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 20 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Polaris IP, LLC. Yahoo!, Inc. served CMRR on 8/30/2007, answer due 9/19/2007. (ch, )
September 7, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 19 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Polaris IP, LLC. Amazon.com, Inc. served CMRR on 8/30/2007, answer due 9/19/2007. (ch, )
September 7, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 18 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Polaris IP, LLC. IAC Search and Media, Inc. served CMRR on 8/31/2007, answer due 9/20/2007. (ch, )
September 7, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 17 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Polaris IP, LLC. America Online, Inc. served CMRR on 8/30/2007, answer due 9/19/2007. (ch, )
September 7, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 16 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Polaris IP, LLC. AOL, LLC. served CMRR on 8/30/2007, answer due 9/19/2007. (ch, )
September 7, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 15 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Polaris IP, LLC. Google Inc. served CMRR on 8/30/2007, answer due 9/19/2007. (ch, )
September 7, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 14 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Polaris IP, LLC. IAC/Interactivecorp served CMRR on 8/31/2007, answer due 9/20/2007. (ch, )
September 7, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 13 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Polaris IP, LLC. Borders, Inc. served CMRR on 8/30/2007, answer due 9/19/2007. (ch, )
September 6, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 12 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Amazon.com, Inc.. (ch, )
September 6, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 11 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned UnExecuted by Polaris IP, LLC. as to Amazon.com, Inc. from the CT Corporation stating deft not listed on the records of the State of TX 8/30/07 (ehs, )
August 28, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Magistrate Consent Form Mailed to Polaris IP, LLC (ch, )
August 28, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 8/28/07. (ch, )
August 28, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kajeer Yar on behalf of Polaris IP, LLC (Yar, Kajeer)
August 28, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jason Woodard Cook on behalf of Polaris IP, LLC (Cook, Jason)
August 28, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 6 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to AOL, LLC., America Online, Inc., IAC/Interactivecorp, IAC Search and Media, Inc., Google Inc., Yahoo!, Inc., Amazon.com, Inc., A9.com, Inc., Borders, Inc., Borders Group, Inc.. (ch, )
August 28, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John J. Edmonds on behalf of Polaris IP, LLC (Edmonds, John)
August 28, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David Michael Pridham on behalf of Polaris IP, LLC (Pridham, David)
August 28, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Polaris IP, LLC identifying Plutus IP, LLC as Corporate Parent. (Edmonds, John)
August 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Albritton, Eric)
August 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AOL, LLC., America Online, Inc., IAC/Interactivecorp, IAC Search and Media, Inc., Google Inc., Yahoo!, Inc., Amazon.com, Inc., A9.com, Inc., Borders, Inc., Borders Group, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 1242779.), filed by Polaris IP, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Albritton, Eric) Corrected Exhibit A added on 8/28/2007 (mpv, ). Modified on 8/28/2007 (mpv, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Polaris IP, LLC v. Google Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Polaris IP, LLC
Represented By: Kajeer Yar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer Parker Ainsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yahoo!, Inc.
Represented By: Jason C White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AOL, LLC.
Represented By: Charles K Verhoeven
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: America Online, Inc.
Represented By: Charles K Verhoeven
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IAC/Interactivecorp
Represented By: Charles K Verhoeven
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IAC Search and Media, Inc.
Represented By: Charles K Verhoeven
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Polaris IP, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: IAC/Interactivecorp
Represented By: Michael A Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: IAC Search and Media, Inc.
Represented By: Michael A Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?