October 29, 2010 |
Filing 669
ORDER granting 666 Motion to Redact re 640 Transcript,,, 646 Transcript,,, 642 Transcript,,, 639 Transcript,,, 637 Transcript,,, 647 Transcript,,, 645 Transcript,,, 644 Transcript,,, 648 Transcript,,, 649 Transcript,,,, 643 Transcript,,, 650 Transcript,,, 638 Transcript,,, 641 Transcript,,,. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 10/29/10. (ehs, )
|
October 12, 2010 |
Filing 668
ORDER granting 667 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Patrick Rolf Anderson terminated for Bright Response, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 10/12/10. (ehs, )
|
October 8, 2010 |
Filing 667
Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Anderson, Patrick)
|
September 30, 2010 |
Filing 666
Unopposed MOTION to Redact 645 Transcript,,, 644 Transcript,,, 648 Transcript,,, 643 Transcript,,, 641 Transcript,,, by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
|
September 24, 2010 |
Filing 665
ORDER granting 664 Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion to Redact Trial Transcript. Defendant Google's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion to Redact Trial Transcript is hereby GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 9/24/10. (ehs, )
|
September 23, 2010 |
Filing 664
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion to Redact Trial Transcript by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
|
September 13, 2010 |
Filing 663
ORDER granting 662 Motion for Extension of Time to File for application for costs or fees. Deadline extended until 14 days after the Court lifts the stay of the remaining inequitable conduct cause of action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 9/13/10. (ehs, )
|
September 10, 2010 |
Filing 662
Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File (Agreed Motion to Extend the Deadline for Application of Fees and Costs) by Bright Response LLC, Google Inc., Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer)
|
September 9, 2010 |
Filing 661
NOTICE by Google Inc. re 648 Transcript,,, Notice of Intent to Request Redaction (Perlson, David)
|
September 9, 2010 |
Filing 660
NOTICE by Google Inc. re 645 Transcript,,, Notice of Intent to Request Redaction (Perlson, David)
|
September 9, 2010 |
Filing 659
NOTICE by Google Inc. re 644 Transcript,,, Notice of Intent to Request Redaction (Perlson, David)
|
September 9, 2010 |
Filing 658
NOTICE by Google Inc. re 643 Transcript,,, Notice of Intent to Request Redaction (Perlson, David)
|
September 9, 2010 |
Filing 657
NOTICE by Google Inc. re 641 Transcript,,, Notice of Intent to Request Redaction (Perlson, David)
|
September 8, 2010 |
Filing 656
ORDER - In accordance with the courts ruling during the 9/3/2010 telephonic conference, the court STAYS and ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSES the remaining inequitable conduct cause of action, pending an en banc opinion from the Federal Circuit in Therasense Inc. v. Becton, Dickinson & Co. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 9/8/2010. (ch, )
|
September 7, 2010 |
Filing 655
NOTICE by Google Inc. Notice of Intent to Pursue Inequitable Conduct Counterclaims (Perlson, David)
|
September 7, 2010 |
Filing 654
NOTICE by Yahoo!, Inc. (Notice of Intent to Pursue Inequitable Conduct Counterclaims) (Doan, Jennifer)
|
September 3, 2010 |
Filing 653
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham: Telephonic Conference held on 9/3/2010. (Jan Lockhart, ECRO.) (jml)
|
September 1, 2010 |
Filing 652
NOTICE of Hearing: TELEPHONIC Hearing on Inequitable Conduct set for 9/3/2010, 10:00 AM, in Mag Ctrm (Marshall) before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham. (delat)
|
August 31, 2010 |
Filing 651
JOINT FINAL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 8/31/10. (ehs, )
|
August 30, 2010 |
Filing 650
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 8/9/10 Verdict before Judge T. John Ward. Court Reporter/Transcriber: S. Simmons/J. Werlinger,Telephone number: 903/935-3868. <P>NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov<P> Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 9/23/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/4/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/2/2010. (lss, )
|
August 30, 2010 |
Filing 649
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 8/7/10 Charge of Court and Closing Arguments before Judge Chad Everingham. Court Reporter/Transcriber: S. Simmons/J. Werlinger,Telephone number: 903/935-3868. <P>NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov<P> Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 9/23/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/4/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/2/2010. (lss, )
|
August 30, 2010 |
Filing 648
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 8/6/10 Afternoon Session before Judge Chad Everingham. Court Reporter/Transcriber: S. Simmons/J. Werlinger,Telephone number: 903/935-3868. <P>NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov<P> Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 9/23/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/4/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/2/2010. (lss, )
|
August 30, 2010 |
Filing 647
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 8/6/10 Morning Session before Judge Chad Everingham. Court Reporter/Transcriber: S. Simmons/J. Werlinger,Telephone number: 903/935-3868. <P>NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov<P> Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 9/23/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/4/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/2/2010. (lss, )
|
August 30, 2010 |
Filing 646
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 8/5/10 JMOLs before Judge Chad Everingham. Court Reporter/Transcriber: S. Simmons/J. Werlinger,Telephone number: 903/935-3868. <P>NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov<P> Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 9/23/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/4/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/2/2010. (lss, )
|
August 30, 2010 |
Filing 645
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 8/5/10 Afternoon Session before Judge Chad Everingham. Court Reporter/Transcriber: S. Simmons/J. Werlinger,Telephone number: 903/935-3868. <P>NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov<P> Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 9/23/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/4/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/2/2010. (lss, )
|
August 30, 2010 |
Filing 644
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 8/5/10 Morning Session before Judge Chad Everingham. Court Reporter/Transcriber: S. Simmons/J. Werlinger,Telephone number: 903/935-3868. <P>NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov<P> Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 9/23/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/4/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/2/2010. (lss, )
|
August 30, 2010 |
Filing 643
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 8/4/10 Afternoon Session before Judge Chad Everingham. Court Reporter/Transcriber: S. Simmons/J. Werlinger,Telephone number: 903/935-3868. <P>NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov<P> Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 9/23/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/4/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/2/2010. (lss, )
|
August 30, 2010 |
Filing 642
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 8/4/10 Morning Session before Judge Chad Everingham. Court Reporter/Transcriber: S. Simmons/J. Werlinger,Telephone number: 903/935-3868. <P>NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov<P> Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 9/23/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/4/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/2/2010. (lss, )
|
August 30, 2010 |
Filing 641
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 8/3/10 Afternoon Session before Judge Chad Everingham. Court Reporter/Transcriber: S. Simmons/J. Werlinger,Telephone number: 903/935-3868. <P>NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov<P> Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 9/23/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/4/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/2/2010. (lss, )
|
August 30, 2010 |
Filing 640
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 8/3/10 Morning Session before Judge Chad Everingham. Court Reporter/Transcriber: S. Simmons/J. Werlinger,Telephone number: 903/935-3868. <P>NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov<P> Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 9/23/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/4/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/2/2010. (lss, )
|
August 30, 2010 |
Filing 639
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 8/2/10 Afternoon Session before Judge Chad Everingham. Court Reporter/Transcriber: S. Simmons/J. Werlinger,Telephone number: 903/935-3868. <P>NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov<P> Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 9/23/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/4/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/2/2010. (lss, )
|
August 30, 2010 |
Filing 638
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 8/2/10 Objections to Exhibits before Judge Chad Everingham. Court Reporter/Transcriber: S. Simmons/ J. Werlinger,Telephone number: 903/935-3868. <P>NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov<P> Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 9/23/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/4/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/2/2010. (lss, )
|
August 30, 2010 |
Filing 637
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 8/2/10 Voir Dire before Judge Chad Everingham. Court Reporter/Transcriber: S. Simmons/J. Werlinger,Telephone number: 903/935-3868. <P>NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov<P> Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 9/23/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/4/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/2/2010. (lss, )
|
August 30, 2010 |
Filing 636
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 8/2/10 Hearing before Judge Chad Everingham. Court Reporter/Transcriber: S. Simmons/J. Werlinger,Telephone number: 903/935-3868. <P>NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov<P> Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 9/23/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/4/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/2/2010. (lss, )
|
August 30, 2010 |
Filing 635
Sealed Transcript. (lss, )
|
August 27, 2010 |
Filing 634
JUDGMENT - In accordance with the jurys verdict, it is ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that Googles AdWords system and Yahoos Sponsored Search system do not infringe claims 30, 31, or 33 of the 947 patent and that the 947 patent is invalid. Therefore, Bright Response takes nothing by way of its patent infringement claims, and those claims are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 8/27/2010. (ch, )
|
August 27, 2010 |
Filing 633
ORDER - Within ten days, the defendants Google, Inc. and Yahoo! Inc. shall file a notice that indicates whether they intend to pursue their inequitable conduct counterclaims against the plaintiff Bright Response, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 8/27/2010. (ch, )
|
August 11, 2010 |
Filing 631
NOTICE by Yahoo!, Inc. of Amended Trial Exhibit List (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Doan, Jennifer)
|
August 9, 2010 |
Filing 628
SEALED Jury Notes. (jml)
|
August 9, 2010 |
Filing 627
JURY VERDICT. (jml)
|
August 9, 2010 |
Filing 626
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge T. John Ward: Jury Trial Day Seven completed on 8/9/2010. (Court Reporter Susan Simmons, CSR.) (jml)
|
August 9, 2010 |
Filing 619
MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Infringement as to Defendant Yahoo Inc. by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wiley, Elizabeth)
|
August 9, 2010 |
Filing 618
MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Infringement as to Defendant Google Inc. by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wiley, Elizabeth)
|
August 9, 2010 |
Filing 617
MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law that the Rice Patent is not Invalid by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wiley, Elizabeth)
|
August 9, 2010 |
Filing 616
MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Written Description and Inventorship by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wiley, Elizabeth)
|
August 9, 2010 |
***Document # 614, Motion. MODIFIED placing motion under seal per attorney.*** (ehs, )
|
August 7, 2010 |
Filing 632
Proposed Jury Instructions(by all parties) Refused by Court on 8-7-10. (jml)
|
August 7, 2010 |
Filing 630
Defendants', Google, Inc. and Yahoo, Inc., Final Exhibit List. (jml)
|
August 7, 2010 |
Filing 629
Plaintiff's Final Exhibit List. (jml)
|
August 7, 2010 |
Filing 625
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham: Jury Trial held on 8/7/2010. (Court Reporter Judy Werlinger, CSR.) (jml)
|
August 7, 2010 |
Filing 615
MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Invalidity for Failure to Satisfy the Written Description Requirement of 35 USC Sec 112 Para 1 by Google Inc., Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 White Declaration, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B)(Doan, Jennifer)
|
August 7, 2010 |
Filing 614
SEALED MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law of Non-Infringement by Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer) Modified on 8/9/2010 placing motion under seal per attorney (ehs, ).
|
August 7, 2010 |
Filing 613
MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Damages by Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer)
|
August 7, 2010 |
Filing 612
NOTICE by Yahoo!, Inc. re 610 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Invalidity (Notice of Joinder in Google's Motion For Judgment as a Matter of Law on Invalidity) (Doan, Jennifer)
|
August 7, 2010 |
Filing 611
SEALED MOTION for Jugment as a Matter of Law on Non-Infringement by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
|
August 7, 2010 |
Filing 610
MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Invalidity by Google Inc.. Responses due by 8/23/2010 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Kevin)
|
August 6, 2010 |
Filing 624
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham: Jury Trial held on 8/6/2010. (Court Reporter Judy Werlinger, CSR.) (jml)
|
August 6, 2010 |
Filing 609
SEALED MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law of No Damages by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Kevin)
|
August 6, 2010 |
Filing 608
NOTICE by Bright Response LLC of Response to Court's Inquiry Re Inequitable Conduct (Anderson, Patrick)
|
August 5, 2010 |
Filing 623
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham: Jury Trial Day Four held on 8/5/2010. (Court Reporter Judy Werlinger, CSR.) (jml)
|
August 5, 2010 |
Filing 607
ORDER withdrawing 572 Sealed Motion for Reconsideratuon of Docket # 566; granting 581 Motion to Withdraw. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 8/5/2010. (ch, )
|
August 5, 2010 |
Filing 606
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 492 Sealed Motion to Preclude Testimony by Dr Edward A Fox. The court grants the request to preclude Dr. Fox from offering an opinion on the 947 patents validity. Dr. Fox may testify that the patent uses e-mail and non- trivial, typically multiword texts as examples of electronic messages, so long as he recognizes that the term is not limited to those examples. The balance of the plaintiffs motion is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 8/5/2010. (ch, )
|
August 4, 2010 |
Filing 622
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham: Jury Trial Day Three held on 8/4/2010. (Court Reporter Judy Werlinger, CSR.) (jml)
|
August 4, 2010 |
Filing 605
ORDER - Supplement to Court's June 18, 2010 Markman opinion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on August 4, 2010. (jml)
|
August 4, 2010 |
Filing 604
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of PRE-TRIAL HEARING held on 7/28/10 before Judge Chad Everingham. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR,Telephone number: (903) 663-5082. (89 Pages)NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/30/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/10/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/5/2010. (tja, )
|
August 4, 2010 |
Filing 603
SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 600 MOTION for Reconsideration re 588 Order,,,, Granting Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 10 (re: non-infringing alternatives) MOTION for Reconsideration re 588 Order,,,, Granting Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 10 (re: non-infringing alternatives), 601 Emergency MOTION for Reconsideration re 588 Order,,,, (Yahoo!'s Emergency Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's Ruling on Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 11)Emergency MOTION for Reconsideration re 588 Order,,,, (Yahoo!'s Emergency Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's Ruling on Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 11) filed by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Elizabeth Wiley, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2)(Wiley, Elizabeth)
|
August 3, 2010 |
Filing 621
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham: Jury Trial Day Two held on 8/3/2010. (Court Reporter Judy Werlinger, CSR.) (jml)
|
August 3, 2010 |
Filing 602
Additional Attachments to Main Document: 600 MOTION for Reconsideration re 588 Order,,,, Granting Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 10 (re: non-infringing alternatives).. (Perlson, David)
|
August 3, 2010 |
Filing 601
Emergency MOTION for Reconsideration re 588 Order,,,, (Yahoo!'s Emergency Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's Ruling on Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 11) by Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer)
|
August 3, 2010 |
Filing 600
MOTION for Reconsideration re 588 Order,,,, Granting Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 10 (re: non-infringing alternatives) by Google Inc.. (Perlson, David) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/3/2010: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (sm, ).
|
August 3, 2010 |
Filing 599
***FILED IN ERROR DOCKETED IN WRONG CASE***br>ORDER REGARDING EXHIBITS -. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 8/3/10. (ehs, ) Modified on 8/3/2010 (ehs, ). Modified on 8/3/2010 (ehs, ).
|
August 3, 2010 |
Filing 598
ORDER - The court overrules the objections to the deposition excerpts of Tak Yan, Erich Spangenberg, Jack Menzel, and Daniel Wright.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 8/3/10. (ehs, )
|
August 3, 2010 |
Filing 597
ORDER denying 526 Sealed Motion to exclude the opinions of Mary A Woodford regarding lump sum royalty. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 8/3/10. (ehs, )
|
August 3, 2010 |
Filing 596
ORDER denying 592 Sealed Motion to preclude Bradlee Sheafe. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 8/3/10. (ehs, )
|
August 3, 2010 |
Filing 595
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 485 Sealed Motion; granting in part and denying in part 505 Sealed Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 8/3/10. (ehs, )
|
August 3, 2010 |
Filing 594
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 525 Sealed Motion to Exclude the testimony and opinions of Dr V Thomas Rhyne. (see attached order). Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 8/3/10. (poa, )
|
August 3, 2010 |
Filing 593
ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE granting 576 Motion to Dismiss. ORDER that all claims and counterclaims asserted in this suit between plaintiff and defendants America Online, Inc and AOL, LLC are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 8/3/10. (poa, )
|
August 3, 2010 |
Filing 592
Emergency SEALED MOTION TO PRECLUDE BRADLEE SHEAFE FROM OFFERING EXPERT TESTIMONY THAT 10% IS A REASONABLE ROYALTY by Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2)(Doan, Jennifer)
|
August 3, 2010 |
NOTICE of DEFICIENCY regarding the #591 Dfts Joint Motion submitted by Google Inc., Yahoo!, Inc.. No certificate of conference included and plaintiff not included. Correction should be made by 1 business day and refiled. (sm, )
|
August 3, 2010 |
***FILED IN ERROR. Document # Order, 599 wrong style and case number. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ehs, )
|
August 2, 2010 |
Filing 620
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham: Jury Trial held on 8/2/2010. (Court Reporter Judy Werlinger, CSR.) (jml)
|
August 2, 2010 |
Filing 591
***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT, PLEASE IGNORE.***Joint MOTION Request for Relief (Jury Instruction) by Google Inc., Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David) Modified on 8/3/2010 (sm, ).
|
August 2, 2010 |
Filing 590
MOTION to Strike Google's Witnesses Whearley and Wagner Disclosed On August 1, 2010 by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wiley, Elizabeth)
|
August 2, 2010 |
Filing 589
Sealed Document. Notice of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Anderson Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A)(Anderson, Patrick)
|
August 2, 2010 |
Filing 588
ORDER - The court issues this supplemental order on motions in limine to address the motions that were carried in the courts previous order (Dkt. No. 571). Bright Response's Motions in Limine 6. GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The court will allow Dr. Branting to testify about the facts disclosed in his dissertation, but he may not go further as a fact witness than what is revealed in the document itself. 10. GRANTED. 11. GRANTED. 32. a. DENIED. b. DENIED. c. GRANTED. d. DENIED. 33. DENIED. Defendants Joint Motions in Limine 7. GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The court will allow evidence of lump sum licenses to the patent-in-suit entered in settlement in support of the defendants damages model.8. DENIED. This motion is denied as a motion in limine, but the court will not allow the plaintiff to offer evidence inconsistent with its 30(b)(6) witnesses testimony or its assertion of privilege. Yahoos Motions in Limine 3. DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 8/2/10. (ehs, )
|
August 2, 2010 |
Filing 587
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 575 Motion for Reconsideration or clarify the court's denial of the pltf's motion in limine no 14. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 8/2/10. (ehs, )
|
August 2, 2010 |
Filing 586
MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER granting in part and denying in part pltf's motion and denying deft's motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 8/2/10. (ehs, )
|
August 2, 2010 |
Filing 585
Additional Attachments to Main Document: 583 Response to Motion.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Wiley Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E)(Wiley, Elizabeth)
|
August 1, 2010 |
Filing 584
RESPONSE to Motion re 578 MOTION to Continue Trial and for Additional Time for Trial filed by Yahoo!, Inc.. (Doan, Jennifer)
|
August 1, 2010 |
Filing 583
RESPONSE to Motion re 578 MOTION to Continue Trial and for Additional Time for Trial filed by Bright Response LLC. (Wiley, Elizabeth)
|
August 1, 2010 |
Filing 582
SEALED MOTION EMERGENCY MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF DOCKET #566 by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Anderson Decl, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Anderson, Patrick)
|
August 1, 2010 |
Filing 581
Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw 572 Emergency SEALED MOTION for Reconsideration of Docket #566 by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Anderson, Patrick)
|
August 1, 2010 |
Filing 580
SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 572 Emergency SEALED MOTION for Reconsideration of Docket #566 filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Perlson, David)
|
August 1, 2010 |
Filing 579
SEALED MOTION to Confirm Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement as to AdMixer and to Preclude Evidence & Opinion of Infringement Under the Doctrine of Equivalents by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
|
August 1, 2010 |
Filing 578
MOTION to Continue Trial and for Additional Time for Trial by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of M. Kammerud, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
|
August 1, 2010 |
Filing 577
STIPULATION by AOL, LLC., America Online, Inc., Bright Response LLC, Google Inc., Yahoo!, Inc.. (Perlson, David)
|
August 1, 2010 |
Filing 576
Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss America Online, Inc. and AOL, LLC with Prejudice by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Anderson, Patrick)
|
July 31, 2010 |
Filing 575
MOTION for Reconsideration OR TO CLARIFY THE COURTS RULING DENYING PLAINTIFFS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 14 (CLAIMS NO LONGER BEING PURSUED) IN LIGHT OF THE COURTS GRANTING MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 15 (PRODUCTS NO LONGER ACCUSED) by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 DECLARATION, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Wiley, Elizabeth)
|
July 30, 2010 |
Filing 574
SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 536 SEALED MOTION Emergency Motion to Strike the Late Served Supplemental Expert Report of W. Christopher Bakewell, Google's Damages Expert filed by AOL, LLC., America Online, Inc., Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of M. Kammerud, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4)(Candido, Amy)
|
July 30, 2010 |
Filing 573
RESPONSE to Motion re 446 SEALED MOTION in Limine 9 (joint) (Supplemental Brief In Support Of Its Response) filed by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Wiley Decl, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C)(Wiley, Elizabeth)
|
July 30, 2010 |
Filing 572
****WITHDRAWN PER ORDER # 607 ****Emergency SEALED MOTION for Reconsideration of Docket #566 by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Patrick Anderson, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Anderson, Patrick) Modified on 8/5/2010 (ch, ).
|
July 30, 2010 |
Filing 571
ORDER granting 439 Motion in Limine; granting 440 Sealed Motion; granting 441 Sealed Motion; granting 442 Motion in Limine; granting 443 Sealed Motion; granting 444 Motion in Limine; granting 446 Sealed Motion; granting 447 Motion in Limine; granting 448 Motion in Limine; granting 449 Sealed Motion; granting 450 Sealed Motion; granting 451 Sealed Motion; granting in part and denying in part and withdrawing 453 Sealed Motion; granting in part and denying in part 454 Sealed Motion; granting in part and denying in part 455 Sealed Motion; granting 457 Sealed Motion; granting in part and denying in part 460 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 462 Sealed Motion; granting in part and denying in part 464 Sealed Motion; granting in part and denying in part 476 Sealed Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/31/2010. (sm, )
|
July 30, 2010 |
Filing 570
ORDER granting 550 Motion for Leave to File A RESPONSE IN Excess Pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/30/2010. (sm, )
|
July 30, 2010 |
Filing 569
ORDER granting 553 Motion to Amend/Correct Scheduling Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/30/2010. (sm, )
|
July 30, 2010 |
Filing 568
ORDER that court allows thirteen hours to each side to present its case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/30/2010. (sm, )
|
July 30, 2010 |
Filing 567
ORDER denying 394 SEALED Motion for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement by Yahoo! Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on July 30, 2010. (jml)
|
July 30, 2010 |
Filing 566
ORDER denying 388 Sealed Motion for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on July 30, 2010. (jml) Modified on 7/30/2010 (jml, ).
|
July 30, 2010 |
Filing 565
Sealed Document - Notice regarding defendants deposition designations by Bright Response. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Wiley, Elizabeth) Modified on 7/30/2010 (sm, ).
|
July 30, 2010 |
Filing 564
***REPLACES DOCUMENT # 562 WHICH WAS FILED IN ERROR***Corrected SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 485 SEALED MOTION (Yahoo!'s Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Plaintiff's Damages Expert Stephen Becker) SEALED MOTION (Yahoo!'s Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Plaintiff's Damages Expert Stephen Becker) filed by Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Josh Thane, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C)(Doan, Jennifer) Modified on 7/30/2010 (ehs, ).
|
July 30, 2010 |
***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 562, Reply. PLEASE IGNORE. SEE DOCKET # 564 FOR CORRECTED ENTRY*** (ehs, )
|
July 30, 2010 |
Set/Reset Hearings: Final Pretrial Conference reset for 7/28/2010 01:30 PM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham. Jury Selection and Trial reset for 8/2/2010 in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham. (sm, )
|
July 29, 2010 |
Filing 563
SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 525 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Testimony and Opinions of Dr. V. Thomas Rhyne filed by AOL, LLC., Google Inc., Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Perlson, David)
|
July 29, 2010 |
Filing 562
***FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY. SEE CORRECTED DOCUMENT #[564***SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 485 SEALED MOTION (Yahoo!'s Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Plaintiff's Damages Expert Stephen Becker) SEALED MOTION (Yahoo!'s Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Plaintiff's Damages Expert Stephen Becker) filed by Yahoo!, Inc.. (Doan, Jennifer) Modified on 7/30/2010 (ehs, ).
|
July 29, 2010 |
Filing 561
SEALED SURREPLY in Opposition to Motion re 505 Google's SEALED MOTION to Exclude Certain Opinions of Plaintiff's Damages Expert Stephen L. Becker filed by Bright Response LLC. (Hoffman, Adam)
|
July 29, 2010 |
Filing 560
SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 485 SEALED MOTION (Yahoo!'s Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Plaintiff's Damages Expert Stephen Becker) filed by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Adam Hoffman, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C)(Hoffman, Adam)
|
July 29, 2010 |
Filing 559
SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 505 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Certain Opinions of Plantiff's Damages Expert Stephen L. Becker filed by AOL, LLC., Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Smith Reply Declaration, # 2 Exhibit L, # 3 Exhibit M)(Smith, Kevin)
|
July 29, 2010 |
Filing 556
ORDER granting 535 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Plaintiffs request for an increase of 5 pages is GRANTED.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/29/10. (ehs, )
|
July 29, 2010 |
Filing 555
ORDER granting 549 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Dkt. No. 485: Yahoo!'s Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Plaintiff's Damages Expert Stephen Becker. Plaintiff is permitted an extension of one day to respond to the above reference motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/29/10. (ehs, )
|
July 29, 2010 |
Filing 554
ORDER granting 473 Motion. Plaintiffs counsel Mr. David Pridham shall be allowed, immediately upon the issuance of this Order, access to all expert reports concerning damages, and any documents relied upon by the experts in those reports concerning the reasonable royalty analysis, which shall be understand to include any report or document in support marked by Defendant as Confidential or Attorneys Eyes Only, which relief also expressly allows Mr. Pridham access to pretrial preparation materials and demonstrative exhibits that may or will also include such information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/29/10. (ehs, )
|
July 29, 2010 |
Filing 553
Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 385 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings, Terminate Motions,,, by AOL, LLC., America Online, Inc., Bright Response LLC, Google Inc., Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Jennifer)
|
July 29, 2010 |
Filing 552
SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document (Exhibit included): 547 Sealed Response to Motion,. (Weiss, Andrew) Modified on 7/29/2010 (sm, ).
|
July 29, 2010 |
Filing 551
SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document (Exhibit B that was not imaged in main document): 548 Sealed Response to Motion,. (Wiley, Elizabeth) Modified on 7/29/2010 (sm, ).
|
July 29, 2010 |
Filing 550
Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Spangler, Andrew)
|
July 29, 2010 |
Filing 549
Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply TO YAHOO'S MOTION TO EXCLUDE (DKT. NO. 485) by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Wiley, Elizabeth)
|
July 29, 2010 |
Filing 548
SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 505 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Certain Opinions of Plantiff's Damages Expert Stephen L. Becker filed by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 DECLARATION, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C)(Wiley, Elizabeth)
|
July 29, 2010 |
Filing 547
SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 525 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Testimony and Opinions of Dr. V. Thomas Rhyne filed by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 DECLARATION, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G)(Weiss, Andrew)
|
July 28, 2010 |
Filing 558
CORRECTED Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 7/28/2010. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign-in Sheet) (jml)
|
July 28, 2010 |
Filing 557
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 7/28/2010. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign-in Sheet) (jml)
|
July 28, 2010 |
Filing 546
SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 492 SEALED MOTION in Limine to Preclude Testimony by Dr. Edward A. Fox filed by AOL, LLC., Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
|
July 28, 2010 |
Filing 545
SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 526 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony from Mary A. Woodford Regarding Lump Sum Royalty (Corrects Doc No. 499) SEALED MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony from Mary A. Woodford Regarding Lump Sum Royalty (Corrects Doc No. 499) filed by Bright Response LLC. (Hoffman, Adam)
|
July 28, 2010 |
Filing 544
ORDER granting 520 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Defendants may exceed the page limit in response to Plaintiffs Motions in Limine 3-33.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/28/10. (ehs, )
|
July 28, 2010 |
Filing 543
SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 530 SEALED MOTION in Limine to Preclude Testimony by Dr. James Allan filed by Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 White Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C)(Doan, Jennifer)
|
July 28, 2010 |
Filing 542
SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 478 SEALED MOTION for Discovery Sanctions filed by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of David Pridham, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Affidavit of Andrew Spangler, # 6 Exhibit A, # 7 Exhibit B, # 8 Exhibit C, # 9 Exhibit D, # 10 Exhibit E, # 11 Exhibit F, # 12 Exhibit G, # 13 Exhibit H, # 14 Exhibit I, # 15 Exhibit J, # 16 Exhibit K, # 17 Exhibit L, # 18 Exhibit M, # 19 Exhibit N, # 20 Exhibit O, # 21 Exhibit P)(Wiley, Elizabeth)
|
July 28, 2010 |
Filing 541
**PLEASE IGNORE - ATTY WILL REFILE *** SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 537 Sealed Response to Motion. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit H, # 2 Exhibit I, # 3 Exhibit J, # 4 Exhibit K, # 5 Exhibit L, # 6 Exhibit M, # 7 Exhibit N, # 8 Exhibit O, # 9 Exhibit P, # 10 Exhibit Q)(Spangler, Andrew) Modified on 7/28/2010 (rml, ).
|
July 28, 2010 |
Filing 540
NOTICE by AOL, LLC., America Online, Inc., Google Inc. re 505 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Certain Opinions of Plantiff's Damages Expert Stephen L. Becker, 525 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Testimony and Opinions of Dr. V. Thomas Rhyne (NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR HEARING) (Ainsworth, Jennifer)
|
July 28, 2010 |
Filing 539
**PLEASE IGNORE - ATTY WILL REFILE ***SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 537 Sealed Response to Motion. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Spangler Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G)(Spangler, Andrew) Modified on 7/28/2010 (rml, ).
|
July 28, 2010 |
Filing 538
**PLEASE IGNORE - ATTY WILL REFILE *** SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 537 Sealed Response to Motion. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Spangler, Andrew) Modified on 7/28/2010 (rml, ).
|
July 28, 2010 |
Filing 537
**PLEASE IGNORE - ATTY WILL REFILE*** SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 478 SEALED MOTION for Discovery Sanctions filed by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Pridham Declaration)(Spangler, Andrew) Modified on 7/28/2010 (rml, ).
|
July 28, 2010 |
Filing 536
SEALED MOTION Emergency Motion to Strike the Late Served Supplemental Expert Report of W. Christopher Bakewell, Google's Damages Expert by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Goldman Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B)(Wiley, Elizabeth) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/28/2010: # 4 Text of Proposed Order) (sm, ).
|
July 28, 2010 |
Filing 535
Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Spangler, Andrew)
|
July 28, 2010 |
DOCUMENT #523 RESPONSE WAS SEALED BY REQUEST OF ATTY. (sm, )
|
July 28, 2010 |
***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 537,538,539,541, Response. Attorney will refile PLEASE IGNORE.*** (rml, )
|
July 27, 2010 |
Filing 534
RESPONSE in Opposition re 527 MOTION to Strike /Exclude Expert Testimony from Dr. L. Karl Branting Regarding Written Description Under Daubert and Rule 702 of the Federal Rules of Evidence filed by AOL, LLC., America Online, Inc., Google Inc., Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Scott Sherwin, # 2 Exhibit 1)(Doan, Jennifer)
|
July 27, 2010 |
Filing 533
SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 526 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony from Mary A. Woodford Regarding Lump Sum Royalty (Corrects Doc No. 499) SEALED MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony from Mary A. Woodford Regarding Lump Sum Royalty (Corrects Doc No. 499) filed by Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Scott Sherwin, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2)(Doan, Jennifer)
|
July 27, 2010 |
Filing 532
REPLY to Response to Motion re 415 Emergency MOTION to Strike Portions of Defendants' Invalidity Expert's Report and Defendants' Summary Judgment Briefing and Request for Expedited Briefing filed by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Andrew D. Weiss, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C)(Weiss, Andrew)
|
July 27, 2010 |
Filing 531
SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 392 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity filed by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Andrew D. Weiss, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B)(Weiss, Andrew)
|
July 27, 2010 |
Filing 530
SEALED MOTION in Limine to Preclude Testimony by Dr. James Allan by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Patrick Anderson, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Anderson, Patrick)
|
July 27, 2010 |
Filing 529
ORDER withdrawing 496 Sealed Motion; granting 502 Motion to Withdraw 496 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/27/10. (ehs, )
|
July 27, 2010 |
Filing 528
ORDER granting 488 Motion to Withdraw 430 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Audrey Spangenberg from Testifying at Trial, 488 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw 430 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Audrey Spangenberg from Testifying at TrialUnopposed MOTION to Withdraw 430 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Audrey Spangenberg from Testifying at Trial. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/27/10. (ehs, )
|
July 27, 2010 |
Filing 527
MOTION to Strike /Exclude Expert Testimony from Dr. L. Karl Branting Regarding Written Description Under Daubert and Rule 702 of the Federal Rules of Evidence by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Elizabeth Wiley, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Wiley, Elizabeth)
|
July 27, 2010 |
Filing 526
SEALED MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony from Mary A. Woodford Regarding Lump Sum Royalty (Corrects Doc No. 499) by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Adam Hoffman, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Hoffman, Adam)
|
July 27, 2010 |
Filing 525
SEALED MOTION to Exclude Testimony and Opinions of Dr. V. Thomas Rhyne by AOL, LLC., America Online, Inc., Google Inc., Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of M. Kammerud, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Affidavit Declaration of J. Thane, # 7 Exhibit 1, # 8 Exhibit 2, # 9 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
|
July 27, 2010 |
Filing 524
Additional Attachments to Main Document (Certificate of Conference ): Notice of Deficiency, 505 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Certain Opinions of Plantiff's Damages Expert Stephen L. Becker.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kammerud, Margaret) Modified on 7/27/2010 (sm, ).
|
July 27, 2010 |
Filing 523
***SEALED PER ATTY***SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 462 SEALED MOTION in Limine No. 1 by Google (Using Documents Produced by Yahoo) filed by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Wiley Decl, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D)(Wiley, Elizabeth) Modified on 7/28/2010 (sm, ). Modified on 7/28/2010 (sm, ).
|
July 27, 2010 |
Filing 522
SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 476 SEALED MOTION (Defendant Yahoo!'s Motions in Limine No. 3 - Reliance on Past Licenses of Large Search Advertising) filed by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Wiley Decl, # 2 Exhibit A)(Wiley, Elizabeth)
|
July 27, 2010 |
Filing 521
SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS (Exhibit B) to Main Document: 513 Sealed Response to Motion in Limine 10. (Anderson, Patrick)
|
July 27, 2010 |
Filing 520
Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO EXCEED THE PAGE LIMIT IN DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTIONS IN LIMINE 3-33 by AOL, LLC., America Online, Inc., Google Inc., Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer)
|
July 27, 2010 |
Filing 519
SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 464 SEALED MOTION in Limine No. 4 filed by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Wiley Decl, # 2 Exhibit A)(Anderson, Patrick)
|
July 27, 2010 |
Filing 518
RESPONSE to Motion re 446 SEALED MOTION in Limine 9 (joint) Admissibility of Reexamination Proceedings filed by Bright Response LLC. (Wiley, Elizabeth)
|
July 27, 2010 |
Filing 517
***FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY***Additional Attachments to Main Document: 510 Response to Motion.. (Wiley, Elizabeth) Modified on 7/27/2010 (ehs, ).
|
July 27, 2010 |
Filing 516
SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 445 SEALED MOTION in Limine 8 (joint) SEALED MOTION in Limine 8 (joint) filed by Bright Response LLC. (Anderson, Patrick)
|
July 27, 2010 |
Filing 515
RESPONSE to Motion re 444 MOTION in Limine 6 (joint) MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 6: MOTION TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE AND ARGUMENT THAT ALLEN DOES NOT DISCLOSE A "NON-INTERACTIVE ELECTRONIC MESSAGE" filed by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 DECLARATION, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C)(Weiss, Andrew)
|
July 27, 2010 |
Filing 514
SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 476 SEALED MOTION (Defendant Yahoo!'s Motions in Limine No. 1 ) filed by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Wiley Decl, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B)(Wiley, Elizabeth)
|
July 27, 2010 |
NOTICE of DEFICIENCY regarding the #494 Motion to exclude testimony of Dr Rhyne submitted by AOL, LLC., Google Inc., Yahoo!, Inc.. No cert of conference included. Correction should be made by 1 business day. This motion is now terminated. (sm, )
|
July 27, 2010 |
NOTICE of DEFICIENCY regarding the #499 Sealed Motion to exclude testimony of Woodford submitted by Bright Response LLC. No cert of conference included. Correction should be made by 1 business day; this motion is now terminated. (sm, )
|
July 27, 2010 |
NOTICE of DEFICIENCY regarding the #484 Motion to strike submitted by Bright Response LLC. No certificate of conference included and no proposed order attached. Correction should be made by 1 business day and refiled. This motion is now terminated. (sm, )
|
July 27, 2010 |
***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 510 and 517, Response w/additional attachments. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ehs, )
|
July 27, 2010 |
*** Document # 487, Response sealed per request of counsel*** (ehs, )
|
July 26, 2010 |
Filing 513
SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 451 SEALED MOTION to Strike and Motion in Limine 10 (joint) SEALED MOTION to Strike and Motion in Limine 10 (joint) SEALED MOTION to Strike and Motion in Limine 10 (joint) filed by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Wiley Decl, # 2 Exhibit A)(Anderson, Patrick)
|
July 26, 2010 |
Filing 512
SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 450 SEALED MOTION in Limine 4 (joint) filed by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 DECLARATION, # 2 Exhibit A)(Weiss, Andrew)
|
July 26, 2010 |
Filing 511
SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 448 MOTION in Limine No. 12 Constructive Notice (Defts Joint) filed by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Wiley Decl, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B)(Wiley, Elizabeth)
|
July 26, 2010 |
Filing 510
***FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY***RESPONSE to Motion re 447 MOTION in Limine 11 (joint) (Indirect Infringement) filed by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Wiley Decl, # 2 Exhibit A)(Wiley, Elizabeth) Modified on 7/27/2010 (ehs, ).
|
July 26, 2010 |
Filing 509
SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 441 SEALED MOTION in Limine 2 (joint) SEALED MOTION in Limine 2 (joint) filed by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 DECLARATION, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F)(Weiss, Andrew)
|
July 26, 2010 |
Filing 508
SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 453 SEALED MOTION in Limine Nos. 3-33 filed by AOL, LLC., America Online, Inc., Google Inc., Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of M. Kammerud, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Affidavit Declaration of M. Shah, # 15 Exhibit 1, # 16 Exhibit 2, # 17 Exhibit 3, # 18 Exhibit 4, # 19 Exhibit 5, # 20 Exhibit 6, # 21 Exhibit 7, # 22 Exhibit 8, # 23 Exhibit 9, # 24 Exhibit 10, # 25 Exhibit 11)(Perlson, David)
|
July 26, 2010 |
Filing 507
RESPONSE in Opposition re 460 MOTION in Limine Number 1 (Uncharted Prior Art References): Motion to Preclude Defendants' Reliance on or Reference to Uncharted Prior Art References (EZ Reader Manual and CBR Express Manuals) and Hearsay MOTION in Limine Number 1 (Uncharted Prior Art References): Motion to Preclude Defendants' Reliance on or Reference to Uncharted Prior Art References (EZ Reader Manual and CBR Express Manuals) and Hearsay MOTION in Limine Number 1 (Uncharted Prior Art References): Motion to Preclude Defendants' Reliance on or Reference to Uncharted Prior Art References (EZ Reader Manual and CBR Express Manuals) and Hearsay filed by AOL, LLC., Google Inc., Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Sistos Decl. ISO Defendants' Response, # 2 Branting Decl ISO Defendants' Response, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit, # 13 Exhibit, # 14 Exhibit, # 15 Exhibit, # 16 Exhibit, # 17 Exhibit, # 18 Exhibit, # 19 Exhibit, # 20 Exhibit, # 21 Exhibit, # 22 Exhibit, # 23 Exhibit, # 24 Exhibit, # 25 Exhibit, # 26 Exhibit, # 27 Exhibit, # 28 Exhibit)(Sistos, Antonio)
|
July 26, 2010 |
Filing 506
SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 457 SEALED MOTION in Limine 7 (joint) SEALED MOTION in Limine 7 (joint) filed by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Hoffman, Adam)
|
July 26, 2010 |
Filing 505
SEALED MOTION to Exclude Certain Opinions of Plantiff's Damages Expert Stephen L. Becker by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Antos Declaration, # 2 Affidavit Smith Declaration, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G, # 10 Exhibit H, # 11 Exhibit I part 1, # 12 Exhibit I part 2, # 13 Exhibit J, # 14 Exhibit K)(Smith, Kevin)
|
July 26, 2010 |
Filing 504
RESPONSE to Motion re 442 MOTION in Limine 3 (joint) MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3: MOTION TO PRECLUDE LEGALLY INCORRECT EVIDENCE AND ARGUMENT REGARDING THE INVENTORS AND DEPLOYMENT OF THE EZ READER SYSTEM filed by Bright Response LLC. (Weiss, Andrew)
|
July 26, 2010 |
Filing 503
SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 454 Google and AOL SEALED MOTION in Limine No.2 (Wealth/Overall Revenues filed by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Wiley Decl, # 2 Exhibit A)(Wiley, Elizabeth)
|
July 26, 2010 |
Filing 502
Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw 496 SEALED MOTION in Limine to Preclude Testimony by Dr. James Allan by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Anderson, Patrick)
|
July 26, 2010 |
Filing 501
SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 476 SEALED MOTION (Defendant Yahoo!'s Motions in Limine No. 2 Stanford License) filed by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Wiley Decl, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B)(Wiley, Elizabeth)
|
July 26, 2010 |
Filing 500
SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 449 SEALED MOTION in Limine 13 (joint) SEALED MOTION in Limine 13 (joint) filed by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 DECLARATION, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G)(Weiss, Andrew)
|
July 26, 2010 |
Filing 499
***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT, PLEASE IGNORE.***SEALED MOTION To Exclude Expert Testimony from Mary A. Woodford Regarding Lump Sum Royalty by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Adam Hoffman, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Hoffman, Adam) Modified on 7/27/2010 (sm, ).
|
July 26, 2010 |
Filing 498
RESPONSE to Motion re 476 SEALED MOTION (Defendant Yahoo!'s Motions in Limine) No. 5 Limit Expert Testimony to Reports filed by Bright Response LLC. (Wiley, Elizabeth)
|
July 26, 2010 |
Filing 497
RESPONSE to Motion re 447 MOTION in Limine 11 (joint) (Indirect Infringement) filed by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Wiley Decl, # 2 Exhibit A)(Wiley, Elizabeth)
|
July 26, 2010 |
Filing 496
***WITHDRAWN PER ORDER # 529 *** SEALED MOTION in Limine to Preclude Testimony by Dr. James Allan by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Anderson Decl, # 2 Exhibit A)(Anderson, Patrick) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/27/2010: # 3 Text of Proposed Order) (sm, ). Modified on 7/27/2010 (ehs, ).
|
July 26, 2010 |
Filing 495
RESPONSE to Motion re 476 SEALED MOTION (Defendant Yahoo!'s Motions in Limine) No. 4 Discovery Conduct and Source Code Production filed by Bright Response LLC. (Wiley, Elizabeth)
|
July 26, 2010 |
Filing 494
***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT, PLEASE IGNORE.***SEALED MOTION to Exclude Testimony and Opinions of Dr. V. Thomas Rhyne by AOL, LLC., Google Inc., Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Margaret P. Kammerud, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Affidavit of Joshua Thane, # 7 Exhibit 1, # 8 Exhibit 2, # 9 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David) Modified on 7/27/2010 (sm, ).
|
July 26, 2010 |
Filing 493
RESPONSE to Motion re 455 SEALED MOTION in Limine 3 (Discovery Conduct) filed by Bright Response LLC. (Wiley, Elizabeth)
|
July 26, 2010 |
Filing 492
SEALED MOTION in Limine to Preclude Testimony by Dr. Edward A. Fox by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Anderson Decl, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B)(Anderson, Patrick) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/27/2010: # 4 Text of Proposed Order) (sm, ).
|
July 26, 2010 |
Filing 491
RESPONSE to Motion re 443 SEALED MOTION in Limine 5 (joint) (Priority Date) filed by Bright Response LLC. (Wiley, Elizabeth)
|
July 26, 2010 |
Filing 490
RESPONSE in Opposition re 439 MOTION in Limine Number 2 (Testimony of Chuck Williams) filed by AOL, LLC., America Online, Inc., Google Inc., Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Todd Kennedy, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Affidavit of James Charles Williams, # 11 Exhibit A, # 12 Exhibit B, # 13 Exhibit C)(Perlson, David)
|
July 26, 2010 |
Filing 489
SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 440 SEALED MOTION in Limine 1 by Defts(Joint) (Re Spangenberg Family Foundation and Ties to Plainiff) filed by Bright Response LLC. (Wiley, Elizabeth)
|
July 26, 2010 |
Filing 488
Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw 430 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Audrey Spangenberg from Testifying at Trial by AOL, LLC., America Online, Inc., Google Inc., Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Jennifer)
|
July 26, 2010 |
Filing 487
***SEALED PER REQUEST OF COUNSEL***RESPONSE to Motion re 473 Emergency MOTION to Allow Bright Response Counsel Mr. David Pridham Access to Expert Reports on Damages and All Documents Relied Upon in Those Reports to Support a Reasonable Royalty Analysis, Including Access to PreTrial Preparation Materials and Demon (Defendants' Response to Bright Response, LLC's Emergency Motion to Allow David Pridham Access to Confidential Financial and Damages Information [Dkt. No. 473]) filed by AOL, LLC., America Online, Inc., Google Inc., Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Doan, Jennifer) Modified on 7/27/2010 (ehs, ).
|
July 26, 2010 |
Filing 486
NOTICE by Yahoo!, Inc. re 485 SEALED MOTION (Yahoo!'s Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Plaintiff's Damages Expert Stephen Becker) SEALED MOTION (Yahoo!'s Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Plaintiff's Damages Expert Stephen Becker) (Notice for Request for Hearing) (Doan, Jennifer)
|
July 26, 2010 |
Filing 485
SEALED MOTION (Yahoo!'s Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Plaintiff's Damages Expert Stephen Becker) by Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration of J. Thane, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5)(Doan, Jennifer)
|
July 26, 2010 |
Filing 484
***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT, PLEASE IGNORE.***MOTION to Strike or Exclude Expert Testimony From Dr. L. Karl Branting Regarding Written Description Under Daubert and Rule 702 of the Federal Rules of Evidence by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Wiley Decl, # 2 Exhibit A)(Wiley, Elizabeth) Modified on 7/27/2010 (sm, ).
|
July 26, 2010 |
Filing 483
Emergency MOTION to Expedite (Emergency Motion for Expedited Briefing Schedule and Request for Hearing regarding Dkt. Nos. 410, 412, & 478) by AOL, LLC., America Online, Inc., Google Inc., Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer)
|
July 26, 2010 |
Filing 482
ORDER - The defendants are ordered to jointly respond to the plaintiffs motion no later than Tuesday, July 27, 2010 at 3:00 p.m. Central Daylight Time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/26/10. (ehs, )
|
July 26, 2010 |
Filing 481
ORDER denying 387 Sealed Motion for summary judgment of invalidity for failure to satisfy the written description requirement (Dkt. No. 387) and the plaintiff Bright Response, LLCs (Bright Response) cross-motion for summary judgment that the written description requirement is satisfied (Dkt. No. 420). Because there are genuine issues of material fact regarding compliance with the written description requirement, the court DENIES both motions for summary judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/26/10. (ehs, )
|
July 26, 2010 |
Filing 480
ORDER finding as moot 195 Sealed Motion to compel source code. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/26/10. (ehs, )
|
July 26, 2010 |
Filing 479
ORDER granting 474 Motion for Access to Non-Google, Non-AOL and Non-Yahoo! Confidential Documents. That Mr. Pridham may have access to any CONFIDENTIAL or CONFIDENTIAL OUTSIDE COUNSEL ONLY documents not produced by Google, AOL or Yahoo; 2. That Mr. Pridham may have access to any documents produced by Google, AOL or Yahoo that were designated CONFIDENTIAL; and 3. That Mr. Pridham may have access to CONFIDENTIAL OUTSIDE COUNSEL ONLY documents produced by Google, AOL or Yahoo that counsel for Google, AOL or Yahoo, as appropriate, have agreed do not contain Google, AOL or Yahoo information.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/26/10. (ehs, )
|
July 23, 2010 |
Filing 478
SEALED MOTION for Discovery Sanctions by AOL, LLC., Google Inc., Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Perlson Declaration, # 2 Affidavit Novikov Declaration, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G, # 10 Exhibit H, # 11 Exhibit I, # 12 Exhibit J, # 13 Exhibit K, # 14 Exhibit L, # 15 Exhibit M, # 16 Exhibit N, # 17 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Kevin)
|
July 23, 2010 |
Filing 477
NOTICE by Yahoo!, Inc. re 387 SEALED MOTION Yahoo! Inc.'s Motion For Summary Judgment Of Invalidity For Failure To Satisfy The Written Description Requirement of 35 U.S.C. § 112, 394 SEALED MOTION Yahoo! Inc.'s Motion For Summary Judgment Of Non-Infringement, 392 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity (Notice for Request for Hearing) (Doan, Jennifer)
|
July 23, 2010 |
Filing 476
SEALED MOTION (Defendant Yahoo!'s Motions in Limine) by Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Thane Declaration, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4)(Doan, Jennifer)
|
July 23, 2010 |
Filing 475
NOTICE by AOL, LLC., America Online, Inc., Google Inc. re 388 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement, 392 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity (NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR HEARING) (Ainsworth, Jennifer)
|
July 23, 2010 |
Filing 474
Unopposed MOTION for Access to Non-Google, Non-AOL and Non-Yahoo! Confidential Documents by David Pridham by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Spangler, Andrew)
|
July 23, 2010 |
Filing 473
Emergency MOTION to Allow Bright Response Counsel Mr. David Pridham Access to Expert Reports on Damages and All Documents Relied Upon in Those Reports to Support a Reasonable Royalty Analysis, Including Access to PreTrial Preparation Materials and Demonstrative Exhibits in Support of Preparing Bright Response's Damages Case by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wiley, Elizabeth)
|
July 23, 2010 |
Filing 472
Additional Attachments to Main Document: 439 MOTION in Limine Number 2 (Testimony of Chuck Williams), 460 MOTION in Limine Number 1 (Uncharted Prior Art References): Motion to Preclude Defendants' Reliance on or Reference to Uncharted Prior Art References (EZ Reader Manual and CBR Express Manuals) and Hearsay MOTION in Limine Number 1 (Uncharted Prior Art References): Motion to Preclude Defendants' Reliance on or Reference to Uncharted Prior Art References (EZ Reader Manual and CBR Express Manuals) and Hearsay MOTION in Limine Number 1 (Uncharted Prior Art References): Motion to Preclude Defendants' Reliance on or Reference to Uncharted Prior Art References (EZ Reader Manual and CBR Express Manuals) and Hearsay, 453 SEALED MOTION in Limine Nos. 3-33.. (Wiley, Elizabeth)
|
July 23, 2010 |
Filing 471
Additional Attachments to Main Document: 457 SEALED MOTION in Limine 7 (joint) SEALED MOTION in Limine 7 (joint), 462 SEALED MOTION in Limine No. 1, 444 MOTION in Limine 6 (joint), 441 SEALED MOTION in Limine 2 (joint) SEALED MOTION in Limine 2 (joint), 449 SEALED MOTION in Limine 13 (joint) SEALED MOTION in Limine 13 (joint), 450 SEALED MOTION in Limine 4 (joint), 454 SEALED MOTION in Limine 2, 440 SEALED MOTION in Limine 1 (Joint) SEALED MOTION in Limine 1 (Joint), 455 SEALED MOTION in Limine 3, 447 MOTION in Limine 11 (joint), 446 SEALED MOTION in Limine 9 (joint), 464 SEALED MOTION in Limine No. 4, 443 SEALED MOTION in Limine 5 (joint), 442 MOTION in Limine 3 (joint), 448 MOTION in Limine 12 (joint), 445 SEALED MOTION in Limine 8 (joint) SEALED MOTION in Limine 8 (joint), 451 SEALED MOTION to Strike and Motion in Limine 10 (joint) SEALED MOTION to Strike and Motion in Limine 10 (joint) SEALED MOTION to Strike and Motion in Limine 10 (joint).. (Kammerud, Margaret)
|
July 23, 2010 |
Filing 470
Additional Attachments to Main Document: 456 SEALED MOTION (Defendant Yahoo! Inc.'s Motions In Limine).. (Doan, Jennifer)
|
July 23, 2010 |
Filing 469
SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 459 Reply to Response to Motion,. (Doan, Jennifer)
|
July 23, 2010 |
Filing 468
SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 456 SEALED MOTION (Defendant Yahoo! Inc.'s Motions In Limine). (Doan, Jennifer)
|
July 23, 2010 |
Filing 467
Additional Attachments to Main Document: 439 MOTION in Limine Number 2 (Testimony of Chuck Williams).. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B)(Wiley, Elizabeth)
|
July 23, 2010 |
Filing 466
***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE.***Additional Attachments to Main Document: 453 SEALED MOTION in Limine Nos. 3-33.. (Wiley, Elizabeth) Modified on 7/23/2010 (ch, ).
|
July 23, 2010 |
Filing 465
REPLY to Response to Motion re 391 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment on Google's Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims, 389 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment on Defendant AOL's Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims, 390 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment on Defendant Yahoo filed by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Wiley Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H)(Wiley, Elizabeth)
|
July 23, 2010 |
Filing 464
SEALED MOTION in Limine No. 4 by America Online, Inc., Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Andrea Pallios Roberts, # 2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Andrea Pallios Roberts, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
|
July 23, 2010 |
Filing 463
SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 394 SEALED MOTION Yahoo! Inc.'s Motion For Summary Judgment Of Non-Infringement filed by Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 White Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2)(Doan, Jennifer)
|
July 23, 2010 |
***FILED IN ERROR. ORDERS ARE NOT FILED ON DOCKET SEPARATELY Document # 466, Additional attachment. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (CLERK HAS ATTACHED ORDER TO # 453)(ch, )
|
July 23, 2010 |
***FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY. Document # 456, Motion. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ehs, )
|
July 22, 2010 |
Filing 462
SEALED MOTION in Limine No. 1 by America Online, Inc., Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Andrea Pallios Roberts, # 2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Andrea Pallios Roberts, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
|
July 22, 2010 |
Filing 461
SEALED ADDITIONAL EXHIBIT D to Main Document: 457 SEALED MOTION in Limine 7 (joint) SEALED MOTION in Limine 7 (joint). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit D-2, # 2 Exhibit D-3)(Candido, Amy)
|
July 22, 2010 |
Filing 460
MOTION in Limine Number 1 (Uncharted Prior Art References): Motion to Preclude Defendants' Reliance on or Reference to Uncharted Prior Art References (EZ Reader Manual and CBR Express Manuals) and Hearsay by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Wiley Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E PART I, # 7 Exhibit E PART II, # 8 Exhibit E PART III, # 9 Exhibit F, # 10 Exhibit G, # 11 Exhibit H, # 12 Exhibit I, # 13 Exhibit J, # 14 Exhibit K, # 15 Text of Proposed Order)(Spangler, Andrew)
|
July 22, 2010 |
Filing 459
SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 387 SEALED MOTION Yahoo! Inc.'s Motion For Summary Judgment Of Invalidity For Failure To Satisfy The Written Description Requirement of 35 U.S.C. § 112 filed by Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of S. Sherwin, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3)(Doan, Jennifer) Modified on 7/23/2010 (ch, ).
|
July 22, 2010 |
Filing 458
SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 388 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement filed by AOL, LLC., Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Eugene Novikov, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4)(Perlson, David)
|
July 22, 2010 |
Filing 457
SEALED MOTION in Limine 7 (joint) by AOL, LLC., America Online, Inc., Google Inc., Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of J. Thane, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Affidavit Declaration of A. Roberts, # 5 Exhibit A, # 6 Exhibit B, # 7 Exhibit C, # 8 Exhibit E, # 9 Exhibit F, # 10 Text of Proposed Order)(Candido, Amy)
|
July 22, 2010 |
Filing 456
***FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY***SEALED MOTION (Defendant Yahoo! Inc.'s Motions In Limine) by Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration of Josh Thane, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4)(Doan, Jennifer) Modified on 7/23/2010 (ehs, ).
|
July 22, 2010 |
Filing 455
SEALED MOTION in Limine 3 by AOL, LLC., America Online, Inc., Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of M. Kammerud, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
|
July 22, 2010 |
Filing 454
SEALED MOTION in Limine 2 by AOL, LLC., America Online, Inc., Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of A. Roberts, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
|
July 22, 2010 |
Filing 453
SEALED MOTION in Limine Nos. 3-33 by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Elizabeth Wiley, # 2 Exhibit A)(Wiley, Elizabeth) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/23/2010: # 3 Text of Proposed Order) (ch, ).
|
July 22, 2010 |
Filing 452
SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 392 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity filed by AOL, LLC., America Online, Inc., Google Inc., Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Andrea Pallios Roberts, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B)(Perlson, David)
|
July 22, 2010 |
Filing 451
SEALED MOTION to Strike and Motion in Limine 10 (joint) by AOL, LLC., America Online, Inc., Google Inc., Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of S. Sherwin, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Affidavit Declaration of E. Novikov, # 4 Exhibit A, # 5 Exhibit B-1, # 6 Exhibit B-2, # 7 Exhibit B-3, # 8 Exhibit B-4, # 9 Exhibit B-5, # 10 Exhibit B-6, # 11 Exhibit B-7, # 12 Exhibit B-8, # 13 Exhibit B-9, # 14 Exhibit C, # 15 Exhibit D, # 16 Text of Proposed Order)(Candido, Amy)
|
July 22, 2010 |
Filing 450
SEALED MOTION in Limine 4 (joint) by AOL, LLC., America Online, Inc., Google Inc., Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of M. Kammerud, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Candido, Amy)
|
July 22, 2010 |
Filing 449
SEALED MOTION in Limine 13 (joint) by AOL, LLC., America Online, Inc., Google Inc., Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of E. Novikov, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Candido, Amy)
|
July 22, 2010 |
Filing 448
MOTION in Limine 12 (joint) by AOL, LLC., America Online, Inc., Google Inc., Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Candido, Amy)
|
July 22, 2010 |
Filing 447
MOTION in Limine 11 (joint) by AOL, LLC., America Online, Inc., Google Inc., Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Candido, Amy)
|
July 22, 2010 |
Filing 446
SEALED MOTION in Limine 9 (joint) by AOL, LLC., America Online, Inc., Google Inc., Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of M. Kammerud, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Candido, Amy)
|
July 22, 2010 |
Filing 445
SEALED MOTION in Limine 8 (joint) by AOL, LLC., America Online, Inc., Google Inc., Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of S. Sherwin, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Affidavit Declaration of A. Roberts, # 4 Exhibit A, # 5 Exhibit B, # 6 Exhibit C, # 7 Exhibit D, # 8 Exhibit E, # 9 Exhibit F, # 10 Exhibit G, # 11 Exhibit H, # 12 Exhibit I, # 13 Exhibit J, # 14 Exhibit K, # 15 Text of Proposed Order)(Candido, Amy)
|
July 22, 2010 |
Filing 444
MOTION in Limine 6 (joint) by AOL, LLC., America Online, Inc., Google Inc., Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of M. Kammerud, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Candido, Amy)
|
July 22, 2010 |
Filing 443
SEALED MOTION in Limine 5 (joint) by AOL, LLC., America Online, Inc., Google Inc., Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of J. Thane, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Candido, Amy)
|
July 22, 2010 |
Filing 442
MOTION in Limine 3 (joint) by AOL, LLC., America Online, Inc., Google Inc., Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Candido, Amy)
|
July 22, 2010 |
Filing 441
SEALED MOTION in Limine 2 (joint) by AOL, LLC., America Online, Inc., Google Inc., Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of M. Kammerud, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Candido, Amy)
|
July 22, 2010 |
Filing 440
SEALED MOTION in Limine 1 (Joint) by AOL, LLC., America Online, Inc., Google Inc., Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of M. Kammerud, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Candido, Amy)
|
July 22, 2010 |
Filing 439
MOTION in Limine Number 2 (Testimony of Chuck Williams) by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Elizabeth Wiley, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Wiley, Elizabeth)
|
July 22, 2010 |
Filing 438
ORDER denying 386 Motion to preclude portions of pltf's expert report. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/22/10. (ehs, )
|
July 21, 2010 |
Filing 437
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Patrick Curran for Google Inc. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-1-5494. (ch, )
|
July 20, 2010 |
Filing 436
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael S Brophy on behalf of Bright Response LLC (Brophy, Michael)
|
July 20, 2010 |
Filing 435
Additional Attachments to Main Document: (CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE) 430 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Audrey Spangenberg from Testifying at Trial.. (Kammerud, Margaret) Modified on 7/20/2010 (ch, ).
|
July 20, 2010 |
Filing 434
Sealed Document. (Joint Final Pre-Trial Order) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Plaintiff's Witness List, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Plaintiff's Amended Deposition Designations with Errata, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Google & AOL's Amended Witness List, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Yahoo's Witness List, # 5 Exhibit 5 - Defendants' Deposition Designations, # 6 Exhibit 6 - Plaintiff's Amended Exhibit List, # 7 Exhibit Defendants' Trial Exhibit List)(Wiley, Elizabeth) Modified on 7/20/2010 (ch, ).
|
July 20, 2010 |
***Document # 430, Motion MODIFIED to add EMERGENTY to the document heading per request of attorney.*** (ehs, )
|
July 19, 2010 |
Filing 433
NOTICE by AOL, LLC., America Online, Inc., Google Inc., Yahoo!, Inc. of Compliance (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Post-Trial Jury Instructions, # 2 Exhibit Proposed Pre-Trial Jury Instructions, # 3 Exhibit Proposed Verdict Form)(Perlson, David)
|
July 19, 2010 |
Filing 432
Proposed Jury Instructions by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Post-Trial Instructions, # 2 Exhibit B - Pre-Trial Instructions, # 3 Exhibit C - Proposed Verdict Form)(Wiley, Elizabeth)
|
July 19, 2010 |
Filing 431
SEALED Response to Motion re 415 Emergency MOTION to Strike Portions of Defendants' Invalidity Expert's Report and Defendants' Summary Judgment Briefing and Request for Expedited Briefing filed by AOL, LLC., America Online, Inc., Google Inc., Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of A. Roberts, # 2 Exhibit A-1, # 3 Exhibit A-2, # 4 Exhibit A-3, # 5 Exhibit B, # 6 Exhibit C, # 7 Exhibit D, # 8 Exhibit E, # 9 Exhibit F, # 10 Exhibit G, # 11 Exhibit H, # 12 Exhibit I, # 13 Exhibit J, # 14 Exhibit K, # 15 Exhibit L, # 16 Exhibit M, # 17 Exhibit N, # 18 Exhibit O, # 19 Exhibit P, # 20 Exhibit Q, # 21 Exhibit R, # 22 Exhibit S, # 23 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
|
July 19, 2010 |
Filing 430
***WITHDRAWN PER ORDER # 528 *** EMERGENCY SEALED MOTION to Exclude Audrey Spangenberg from Testifying at Trial by AOL, LLC., America Online, Inc., Google Inc., Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of John LaBarre, # 2 Affidavit Declaration of David A. Perlson, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G, # 10 Exhibit H, # 11 Exhibit I, # 12 Exhibit J, # 13 Exhibit K, # 14 Exhibit L, # 15 Exhibit M, # 16 Exhibit N, # 17 Exhibit O, # 18 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David) Modified on 7/20/2010 (ehs, ). Modified on 7/27/2010 (ehs, ).
|
July 19, 2010 |
Filing 429
ORDER REGARDING EXHIBITS - due to the voluminious exhibits expected to be tendered during the trial of this case the courts ORDERES the following herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/19/2010. (ch, )
|
July 19, 2010 |
Filing 428
Additional Attachments to Main Document: 423 Sealed Response to Motion,,,,.. (Perlson, David)
|
July 19, 2010 |
Filing 427
SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 426 Sealed Response to Motion,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B - 1 of 3, # 2 Exhibit B - 2 of 3, # 3 Exhibit B - 3 of 3)(Wiley, Elizabeth)
|
July 18, 2010 |
Filing 426
SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 386 SEALED MOTION to Preclude Plaintiff from Submitting an Expert Report That Relies on Infringement Theories Not Adequately Disclosed in Plaintiff's Interrogatory Responses filed by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Elizabeth Wiley, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Wiley, Elizabeth)
|
July 16, 2010 |
Filing 425
Sealed Notice of Errata re: Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion for Summary Judgment on Defendants Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit F)(Perlson, David)
|
July 16, 2010 |
Filing 424
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian A E Smith on behalf of Yahoo!, Inc. (Smith, Brian)
|
July 15, 2010 |
Filing 423
SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 391 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment on Google's Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims, 389 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment on Defendant AOL's Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims, 390 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment on Defendant Yahoo filed by AOL, LLC., America Online, Inc., Google Inc., Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Andrea Roberts, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C-1, # 5 Exhibit C-2, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G, # 10 Exhibit H, # 11 Exhibit I-1, # 12 Exhibit I-2, # 13 Exhibit J, # 14 Exhibit K, # 15 Exhibit L, # 16 Exhibit M, # 17 Exhibit N, # 18 Exhibit O, # 19 Exhibit P, # 20 Exhibit Q, # 21 Exhibit R-1, # 22 Exhibit R-2, # 23 Exhibit S, # 24 Exhibit T, # 25 Exhibit U, # 26 Exhibit V, # 27 Exhibit W, # 28 Exhibit X, # 29 Exhibit Y, # 30 Exhibit Z, # 31 Exhibit AA, # 32 Exhibit BB, # 33 Exhibit CC, # 34 Exhibit DD, # 35 Exhibit EE, # 36 Affidavit of Karl Branting and Ex. 1, # 37 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/16/2010: # 38 REVISED ORDER) (ch, ).
|
July 15, 2010 |
Filing 422
SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 420 Response to Motion, 419 Sealed Response to Motion. (Fenster, Marc)
|
July 15, 2010 |
Filing 421
SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 419 Sealed Response to Motion, 420 Response to Motion. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K)(Fenster, Marc)
|
July 15, 2010 |
Filing 420
RESPONSE to Motion re 387 SEALED MOTION Yahoo! Inc.'s Motion For Summary Judgment Of Invalidity For Failure To Satisfy The Written Description Requirement of 35 U.S.C. § 112 filed by Bright Response LLC. (Fenster, Marc)
|
July 15, 2010 |
Filing 419
SEALED RESPONSE to Defendants Motion re 392 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity filed by Bright Response LLC. (Fenster, Marc)
|
July 15, 2010 |
Filing 418
SEALED RESPONSE to Google and AOL Motion re 388 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement filed by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Rhyne Dec/Report, # 2 Exhibit B - Weiss Dec, # 3 Exhibit B-1, # 4 Exhibit B-2, # 5 Exhibit B-3, # 6 Exhibit B-4)(Fenster, Marc)
|
July 15, 2010 |
Filing 417
SEALED RESPONSE to Yahoo! Motion re 394 SEALED MOTION Yahoo! Inc.'s Motion For Summary Judgment Of Non-Infringement filed by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Fenster, Marc)
|
July 14, 2010 |
Filing 416
REPORT of Mediation by Jerry Grissom. Mediation result: impasse(ehs, )
|
July 14, 2010 |
Filing 415
Emergency MOTION to Strike Portions of Defendants' Invalidity Expert's Report and Defendants' Summary Judgment Briefing and Request for Expedited Briefing by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Elizabeth Wiley, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit A-1, # 4 Exhibit A-2, # 5 Exhibit A-3 - part 1, # 6 Exhibit A-3 - part 2, # 7 Exhibit A-3 - part 3, # 8 Exhibit A-4, # 9 Exhibit A-5 - part 1, # 10 Exhibit A-5 - part 2, # 11 Exhibit A-5 - part 3, # 12 Exhibit B, # 13 Exhibit C, # 14 Exhibit D, # 15 Exhibit E, # 16 Text of Proposed Order)(Wiley, Elizabeth)
|
July 14, 2010 |
Filing 414
ORDER granting 413 Motion to Withdraw its Motion for Verbal Reprimand to Yahoo Counsel for Continued and Vexatious Conduct with Respect to Mr. David Pridham and Request for Court Order Allowing Mr. Pridham to Participate in and Review Pre-trial Preparation Materials. Motion withdrawn without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 714/10. (ehs, )
|
July 13, 2010 |
Filing 413
Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw 411 MOTION For Verbal Reprimand to Yahoo Cousel for Continued and Vexatious Conduct with Respect to Mr. David Pridham and Request for Court Order Allowing Mr. Pridham to Participate in and Review Pre-Trial Preparation Materials by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Spangler, Andrew)
|
July 13, 2010 |
Filing 412
Emergency SEALED MOTION (Yahoo!'s Emergency Motion to Strike Portions of Plaintiff's July 6, 2010 Expert Report on Damages) by Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B)(Thane, Joshua)
|
July 13, 2010 |
Filing 411
MOTION For Verbal Reprimand to Yahoo Cousel for Continued and Vexatious Conduct with Respect to Mr. David Pridham and Request for Court Order Allowing Mr. Pridham to Participate in and Review Pre-Trial Preparation Materials by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Spangler Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Wiley, Elizabeth)
|
July 12, 2010 |
Filing 410
SEALED MOTION Emergency Motion to Strike Portions of Plaintiff's July 6, 2010 Expert Reports on Damages by America Online, Inc., Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Andrea Pallios Roberts, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
|
July 9, 2010 |
Filing 409
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Todd M Kennedy for Google Inc..(APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-1-5469)(ehs, )
|
July 9, 2010 |
Filing 408
ORDER granting 407 Motion for Leave to File supplement its infringement contentions as set forth in the above-referenced stipulationto amend the cover pleading to assert claims 28, 30, 31, 33 and 38 of the '947 patent against Google. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/9/10. (ehs, )
|
July 8, 2010 |
Filing 407
Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File (to Supplement its Infringement Contentions as to Google, Inc.) by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wiley, Elizabeth)
|
July 7, 2010 |
Filing 406
ORDER - granting 402 Motion to Withdraw Motion to Compel. Withdrawing 361 Sealed Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/7/2010. (ch, )
|
July 7, 2010 |
Filing 405
ORDER granting 401 Motion for Leave to Supplement its Infringement Contentions as to AOl. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/7/2010. (ch, )
|
July 7, 2010 |
Filing 404
NOTICE by Google Inc. Request for Daily Transcripts and Real Time Reporting of Court Proceedings (Perlson, David)
|
July 7, 2010 |
Filing 403
NOTICE by Bright Response LLC of Request for Daily Transcripts and Real Time Reporting of Court Proceedings (Spangler, Andrew)
|
July 6, 2010 |
Filing 402
Consent MOTION to Withdraw 361 SEALED MOTION To Compel Google Inc. To Produce Ad Spam Filtering Source Code And Related Witnesses by Bright Response LLC. (Weiss, Andrew) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/7/2010: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (ch, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/7/2010: # 2 REVISED ORDER) (ch, ).
|
July 6, 2010 |
Filing 401
Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File (Supplement its Infringement Contentions as to AOL, LLC and America Online, Inc.) by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wiley, Elizabeth)
|
July 6, 2010 |
Filing 400
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Margaret Pirnie Kammerud for Google Inc. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-1-5462. (ch, )
|
July 6, 2010 |
Filing 399
ORDER granting 398 Motion for Leave to Supplement its Infringement Contentions.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/6/2010. (ch, )
|
July 2, 2010 |
Filing 398
Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Infringement Contentions as to Yahoo by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wiley, Elizabeth)
|
July 2, 2010 |
Filing 397
STIPULATION between Bright Response and Google by Bright Response LLC. (Wiley, Elizabeth)
|
July 2, 2010 |
Filing 396
STIPULATION between Bright Response and Yahoo by Bright Response LLC. (Wiley, Elizabeth)
|
July 2, 2010 |
NOTICE - clerk modified Document # 392, to show Sealed per request from attorney. (ch, )
|
July 1, 2010 |
Filing 395
Additional Attachments to Main Document: 392 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity.. (Perlson, David)
|
July 1, 2010 |
Filing 394
SEALED MOTION Yahoo! Inc.'s Motion For Summary Judgment Of Non-Infringement by Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration of Jason White, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G, # 10 Exhibit H, # 11 Exhibit I, # 12 Exhibit J, # 13 Declaration of Dave Kolm, # 14 Declaration of Jean-Marc Langois, # 15 Declaration of Zachary Zhang)(Doan, Jennifer)
|
July 1, 2010 |
Filing 393
NOTICE by Yahoo!, Inc. (Yahoo!'s Notice Of Request For Daily Transcripts And Real Time Reporting Of Court Proceedings) (Doan, Jennifer)
|
July 1, 2010 |
Filing 392
SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity by AOL, LLC., America Online, Inc., Google Inc., Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Todd Kennedy, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit N, # 16 Exhibit O, # 17 Affidavit of Bradley Allen, # 18 Exhibit A, part 1 of 2, # 19 Exhibit A, part 2 of 2, # 20 Exhibit B)(Perlson, David) Modified on 7/2/2010 (ch, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/2/2010: # 21 Text of Proposed Order) (ch, ).
|
July 1, 2010 |
Filing 391
SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment on Google's Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Elizabeth Wiley, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Wiley, Elizabeth)
|
July 1, 2010 |
Filing 390
SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment on Defendant Yahoo by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Elizabeth Wiley, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Wiley, Elizabeth)
|
July 1, 2010 |
Filing 389
SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment on Defendant AOL's Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Elizabeth Wiley, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Wiley, Elizabeth)
|
July 1, 2010 |
Filing 388
SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement by AOL, LLC., America Online, Inc., Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Bartholomew Furrow, # 2 Affidavit of Jack Menzel, # 3 Affidavit of Bahman Rabii, # 4 Affidavit of Eugene Novikov, # 5 Exhibit A, # 6 Exhibit B, # 7 Exhibit C, # 8 Exhibit D-1, # 9 Exhibit D-2, # 10 Exhibit D-3, # 11 Exhibit D-4, # 12 Exhibit D-5, # 13 Exhibit D-6, # 14 Exhibit D-7, # 15 Exhibit D-8, # 16 Exhibit D-9, # 17 Exhibit E, # 18 Exhibit F-1, # 19 Exhibit F-2, # 20 Exhibit F-3, # 21 Exhibit F-4, # 22 Exhibit G, # 23 Exhibit H, # 24 Exhibit I, # 25 Exhibit J, # 26 Exhibit K, # 27 Exhibit L, # 28 Exhibit M-1, # 29 Exhibit M-2, # 30 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
|
July 1, 2010 |
Filing 387
SEALED MOTION Yahoo! Inc.'s Motion For Summary Judgment Of Invalidity For Failure To Satisfy The Written Description Requirement of 35 U.S.C. § 112 by Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration of Jason White, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C)(Doan, Jennifer)
|
June 30, 2010 |
Filing 386
SEALED MOTION to Preclude Plaintiff from Submitting an Expert Report That Relies on Infringement Theories Not Adequately Disclosed in Plaintiff's Interrogatory Responses by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Eugene Novikov, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B-1, # 4 Exhibit B-2, # 5 Exhibit B-3, # 6 Exhibit B-4, # 7 Exhibit C, # 8 Exhibit D, # 9 Exhibit E)(Perlson, David) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/1/2010: # 10 Text of Proposed Order) (ch, ).
|
June 30, 2010 |
Filing 385
AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER - Motions due by 7/22/2010., Proposed Pretrial Order due by 7/19/2010., Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/28/2010 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham.), Motions terminated: 384 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order filed by Google Inc., America Online, Inc., Yahoo!, Inc., AOL, LLC., Bright Response LLC.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/30/10. (ehs, )
|
June 29, 2010 |
Filing 384
Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order by AOL, LLC., America Online, Inc., Bright Response LLC, Google Inc., Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer)
|
June 28, 2010 |
Filing 383
AMENDED AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/28/10. (ehs, )
|
June 28, 2010 |
Filing 382
REPORT of Mediation. Mediation result: impasse(ehs, )
|
June 28, 2010 |
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven: Settlement Conference held on 6/28/2010 between Plaintiff and Defendant Yahoo! Mediation resulted in an impasse. (Court Reporter none.) (lfs, )
|
June 25, 2010 |
Filing 381
Unopposed MOTION for Entry of Amended Protective Order by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Spangler, Andrew)
|
June 25, 2010 |
Filing 380
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Adam S Goldberg on behalf of Bright Response LLC (Goldberg, Adam)
|
June 25, 2010 |
Filing 379
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediator Jerry Grissom of JAMS, 8401 North Central Expressway, Suite 610, Dallas, Texas, 75225, telephone number 214/744-5267 and fax number 214/720- 6010, is hereby appointed as mediator. Mediation deadline is 7/1/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/24/2010. (ch, )
|
June 24, 2010 |
Filing 378
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Amy H Candido on behalf of Google Inc. (Candido, Amy)
|
June 24, 2010 |
Filing 377
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John C Hueston on behalf of Bright Response LLC (Hueston, John)
|
June 24, 2010 |
Filing 376
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney John C Hueston for Bright Response LLC. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-1-5432) (ehs, )
|
June 24, 2010 |
Filing 375
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Adam S Goldberg for Bright Response LLC. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-1-5431) (ehs, )
|
June 23, 2010 |
Filing 374
ORDER - the court will maintain the currently scheduled trial date of August 2, 2010. The parties are to meet and confer and submit an amended docket control order that conforms with this schedule. Should Googles counsel become available later in August, the court will consider scheduling the trial date later in the month. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/23/10. (ehs, )
|
June 23, 2010 |
Filing 373
ORDER denying 370 Motion to Stay. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/23/10. (ehs, )
|
June 23, 2010 |
Filing 372
REPLY to Response to Motion re 370 MOTION to Stay Yahoo! Inc.'s Motion For A Limited Stay Pending The Resolution Of Yahoo!'s Petition For Writ Of Mandamus To The Federal Circuit filed by Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Doan, Jennifer)
|
June 22, 2010 |
Filing 371
RESPONSE in Opposition re 370 MOTION to Stay Yahoo! Inc.'s Motion For A Limited Stay Pending The Resolution Of Yahoo!'s Petition For Writ Of Mandamus To The Federal Circuit filed by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Elizabeth Wiley, # 2 Exhibit A to Wiley Declaration, # 3 Affidavit of Andrew Weiss)(Wiley, Elizabeth)
|
June 18, 2010 |
Filing 370
MOTION to Stay Yahoo! Inc.'s Motion For A Limited Stay Pending The Resolution Of Yahoo!'s Petition For Writ Of Mandamus To The Federal Circuit by Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer)
|
June 18, 2010 |
Filing 369
MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER concerning the claim construction issues. The court adopts the constructions set forth in this opinion for the disputed terms of the 947 patent. The parties are ordered that they may not refer, directly or indirectly, to each others claim construction positions in the presence of the jury. Likewise, the parties are ordered to refrain from mentioning any portion of this opinion, other than the actual definitions adopted by the court, in the presence of the jury. Any reference to claim construction proceedings is limited to informing the jury of the definitions adopted by the court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/18/10. (ehs, )
|
June 18, 2010 |
Filing 368
ORDER - Within seven days of this order, the plaintiff shall submit a protective order that contains the following text in paragraphs 6a and 8a: Outside litigation counsel of record and supporting personnel employed in the law firm(s) of outside litigation counsel of record, such as attorneys, paralegals, legal translators, legal secretaries, legal clerks and shorthand reporters (With the exception that such information shall not be available to David Pridham, employees of the Law Office of David Pridham and employees under David Pridhams direction or control without express permission of the Court). Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/18/10. (ehs, )
|
June 18, 2010 |
Filing 367
ORDER denying 363 Motion for partial reconsideration of the order compelling production of the Click Protection System source code. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/18/10. (ehs, )
|
June 18, 2010 |
Filing 366
ORDER denying 364 Motion to Stay discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/18/10. (ehs, )
|
June 17, 2010 |
Filing 365
RESPONSE in Opposition re 364 MOTION to Stay Discovery Ordered In Docket Number 355 Until An Amended Protective Order Is Entered And Pending The Resolution Of Yahoo!'s Motion For Partial Reconsideration filed by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Liz Wiley, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B)(Wiley, Elizabeth)
|
June 15, 2010 |
Filing 364
MOTION to Stay Discovery Ordered In Docket Number 355 Until An Amended Protective Order Is Entered And Pending The Resolution Of Yahoo!'s Motion For Partial Reconsideration by Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer)
|
June 15, 2010 |
Filing 363
SEALED MOTION For Partial Reconsideration of Docket Number 355 Regarding Production of The Click Protection Source Code by Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Declaration of Jason White, # 4 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Jason White, # 5 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Jason White, # 6 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Jason White, # 7 Declaration of Chi-Chao Chang)(Doan, Jennifer)
|
June 15, 2010 |
Filing 362
RESPONSE in Opposition re 356 Opposed MOTION to Amend/Correct Protective Order filed by Yahoo!, Inc.. (Doan, Jennifer)
|
June 15, 2010 |
Filing 361
SEALED MOTION To Compel Google Inc. To Produce Ad Spam Filtering Source Code And Related Witnesses by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Andrew D. Weiss, # 2 Exhibit A to Weiss Decl., # 3 Exhibit B to Weiss Decl., # 4 Exhibit C to Weiss Decl., # 5 Exhibit D to Weiss Decl., # 6 Exhibit E to Weiss Decl., # 7 Exhibit F to Weiss Decl., # 8 Exhibit G to Weiss Decl., # 9 Exhibit H to Weiss Decl., # 10 Exhibit I to Weiss Decl., # 11 Text of Proposed Order)(Weiss, Andrew)
|
June 10, 2010 |
Filing 360
NOTICE by Bright Response LLC of Filing Letter Brief of David Pridham in Support of Bright Response, LLC's Opposed Motion at Docket Number 356 (Attachments: # 1 Attachment)(Pridham, David)
|
June 10, 2010 |
Filing 359
***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE.*** Notice by Bright Response LLC (Letter Brief of David Pridham in support of Bright Response Dkt No. 356) (Pridham, David) Modified on 6/10/2010 (ch, ).
|
June 10, 2010 |
***FILED IN ERROR. NEED TO FILE NOTICE AND ATTACH THE LETTER AS AS ATTACHMENT Document # 359, Notice. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
|
June 9, 2010 |
Filing 358
NOTICE by AOL, LLC., Google Inc. re 357 MOTION for Entry of Amended Protective Order Notice of Joinder in Defendant Yahoo!'s Motion for Entry of Amended Protective Order (Perlson, David)
|
June 9, 2010 |
Filing 357
MOTION for Entry of Amended Protective Order by Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Doan, Jennifer) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/10/2010: # 6 Text of Proposed Order) (ch, ).
|
June 9, 2010 |
Filing 356
Opposed MOTION to Amend/Correct Protective Order by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Spangler Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I)(Spangler, Andrew) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/15/2010: # 11 Text of Proposed Order) (ch, ).
|
June 8, 2010 |
Filing 355
ORDER granting 322 Sealed Motion Emergency Supplemental Brief in support of its motion to compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/8/2010. (ch, )
|
June 8, 2010 |
Filing 354
ORDER denying 252 Sealed Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/8/2010. (ch, )
|
June 7, 2010 |
Filing 353
SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 322 SEALED MOTION Emergency Supplemental Brief in Support of January 25, 2010 Motion to Compel Yahoo! Inc. to Comply with Court Order of November 5, 2009 and Produce Source Code in Native Format (Yahoo! Inc.'s Sur-Reply to Bright Response, LLC's Emergency Supplemental Brief in Support of January 25, 2010 Motion to Compel Yahoo! Inc. to Comply with Court Order of November 5, 2009 and Produce Source Code in Native Format as Maintained in the Ordinary Course of Business) filed by Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit F)(Doan, Jennifer)
|
June 4, 2010 |
Filing 352
ORDER granting 351 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Todd Y Brandt terminated as counsel for Bright Response LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/4/2010. (ch, )
|
June 3, 2010 |
Filing 351
Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brandt, Todd)
|
June 3, 2010 |
Filing 350
ORDER SCHEDULING MEDIATION CONFERENCE, (Mediation Conference set for 6/28/2010 10:00 AM in Ctrm 403 (Texarkana) before Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven.). Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 6/3/2010. (sm, )
|
June 2, 2010 |
Filing 349
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 288 Sealed Motion to Amend the Protective Order. The parties shall jointly submit an amended protective order within seven days that complies with the rulings in this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/2/2010. (ch, )
|
June 1, 2010 |
Filing 348
AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER - Motions due by 7/19/2010., Proposed Pretrial Order due by 7/9/2010., Jury Selection set for 8/2/2010 09:00AM before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham., Jury Trial set for 8/2/2010 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham., Pretrial Conference set for 7/28/2010 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/1/10. (ehs, )
|
June 1, 2010 |
Filing 347
ORDER granting 342 Motion for Leave to Amend and serve their Invalidity Contentions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/1/10. (ehs, )
|
May 28, 2010 |
Filing 346
SEALED RESPONSE by Bright Response LLC to 324 Sealed Document (Reply to Yahoo!'s Amended Counterclaims) filed by Bright Response LLC. (Weiss, Andrew)
|
May 28, 2010 |
Filing 345
SEALED RESPONSE by Bright Response LLC to 330 Sealed Document (Reply to AOL's Amended Counterclaims) filed by Bright Response LLC. (Weiss, Andrew)
|
May 28, 2010 |
Filing 344
SEALED RESPONSE by Bright Response LLC to 329 Sealed Document (Reply to Google's Amended Counterclaims) filed by Bright Response LLC. (Weiss, Andrew)
|
May 28, 2010 |
Filing 343
Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 115 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings,, by AOL, LLC., America Online, Inc., Bright Response LLC, Google Inc., Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Jennifer)
|
May 28, 2010 |
Filing 342
Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to Amend Their Invalidity Contentions by AOL, LLC., Google Inc., Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer)
|
May 28, 2010 |
Filing 341
SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 322 SEALED MOTION Emergency Supplemental Brief in Support of January 25, 2010 Motion to Compel Yahoo! Inc. to Comply with Court Order of November 5, 2009 and Produce Source Code in Native Format filed by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Liz Wiley, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E)(Wiley, Elizabeth)
|
May 28, 2010 |
Filing 340
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediator Judge Caroline Craven. Mediation deadline is 6/30/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 5/28/2010. (ch, )
|
May 24, 2010 |
Filing 339
RESPONSE in Opposition re 322 SEALED MOTION Emergency Supplemental Brief in Support of January 25, 2010 Motion to Compel Yahoo! Inc. to Comply with Court Order of November 5, 2009 and Produce Source Code in Native Format filed by Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Scott Sherwin, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Declaration of Jennifer Doan, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4)(Doan, Jennifer)
|
May 20, 2010 |
Filing 338
ORDER granting 327 Motion for Leave to File Amended Answer and Counterclaims. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 5/20/2010. (ch, )
|
May 20, 2010 |
Filing 337
ORDER denying 301 Unopposed Motion to Continue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 5/20/2010. (ch, )
|
May 18, 2010 |
Filing 336
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Scott D Sherwin on behalf of Yahoo!, Inc. (Sherwin, Scott)
|
May 18, 2010 |
Filing 335
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mansi H. Shah on behalf of Yahoo!, Inc. (Shah, Mansi)
|
May 12, 2010 |
Filing 334
SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 288 Emergency SEALED MOTION (Expedited Motion to Amend Protective Order)Emergency SEALED MOTION (Expedited Motion to Amend Protective Order) filed by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Elizabeth Wiley, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Affidavit Declaration of David Pridham)(Wiley, Elizabeth)
|
May 12, 2010 |
Filing 333
Additional Attachments to Main Document: 326 Sealed Additional Attachments to Main Document, 330 Sealed Document, 329 Sealed Document, 328 Sealed Additional Attachments to Main Document.. (Roberts, Andrea)
|
May 12, 2010 |
Filing 332
ORDER granting 325 Motion for Leave to File Amended Answer and Counterclaims. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 5/12/2010. (ch, )
|
May 12, 2010 |
Filing 331
ORDER granting 323 Motion for Leave to File Amended Answer and Counterclaims. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 5/12/2010. (ch, )
|
May 12, 2010 |
Filing 330
Sealed Document - Dfts AOL LLC's and America Online Inc's Amended Answer and Counterclaims (Perlson, David) Modified on 5/12/2010 (ch, ).
|
May 12, 2010 |
Filing 329
Sealed Document - Dft Google Inc. Amended Answer and Counterclaims to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. (Perlson, David) Modified on 5/12/2010 (ch, ).
|
May 11, 2010 |
Filing 328
SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 327 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer and Counterclaims. (Perlson, David)
|
May 11, 2010 |
Filing 327
MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer and Counterclaims by AOL, LLC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
|
May 11, 2010 |
Filing 326
SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 325 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer and Counterclaims. (Perlson, David)
|
May 11, 2010 |
Filing 325
MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer and Counterclaims by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
|
May 11, 2010 |
Filing 324
Sealed Document Yahoo! Inc.'s Amended Answer, Affirmative Defenses, and Counterclaims to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. (Doan, Jennifer)
|
May 11, 2010 |
Filing 323
Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer by Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer)
|
May 7, 2010 |
Filing 322
SEALED MOTION Emergency Supplemental Brief in Support of January 25, 2010 Motion to Compel Yahoo! Inc. to Comply with Court Order of November 5, 2009 and Produce Source Code in Native Format by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Elizabeth Wiley, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Text of Proposed Order)(Wiley, Elizabeth)
|
May 7, 2010 |
***FILED IN ERROR. FILED UNDER WRONG EVENT. Document # 321, Sealed Document. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
|
May 6, 2010 |
Filing 321
***FILED IN ERROR. WRONG EVENT. PLEASE IGNORE.***Sealed Document. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Elizabeth Wiley, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Text of Proposed Order)(Wiley, Elizabeth) Modified on 5/7/2010 (ch, ).
|
May 6, 2010 |
Filing 320
ORDER granting 318 Motion for Extension of Time to File; granting 318 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply ( Responses due by 5/12/2010). Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 5/6/10. (ehs, )
|
May 5, 2010 |
Filing 319
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Todd Y Brandt on behalf of Bright Response LLC (Brandt, Todd)
|
May 3, 2010 |
Filing 318
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Sur-Reply, MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Yahoo's Expedited Motion to Amend Protective Order by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wiley, Elizabeth)
|
April 20, 2010 |
Filing 315
ORDER granting 312 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply in Support of Expedited Motion to Amend the Protective Order. Responses due by 4/26/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 4/20/10. (ehs, )
|
April 20, 2010 |
Filing 314
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of MOTION TO COMPEL HEARING held on 4/1/10 before Judge Chad Everingham. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR,Telephone number: (903) 663-5082. (31 pages)NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/14/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/24/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/22/2010. (tja, )
|
April 20, 2010 |
Filing 313
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of CLAIM CONSTRUCTION HEARING held on 4/1/10 before Judge Chad Everingham. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR,Telephone number: (903) 663-5082. (111 pages)NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/14/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/24/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/22/2010. (tja, )
|
April 19, 2010 |
Filing 312
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply in Support of Expedited Motion to Amend the Protective Order by Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer)
|
April 9, 2010 |
Filing 308
ORDER granting 307 Motion to Withdraw ; withdrawing 251 Sealed Motion filed by Bright Response shall be withdrawn without prejucie. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 4/9/10. (ehs, )
|
April 7, 2010 |
Filing 307
Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw 251 Interim SEALED MOTION by Bright Response, LLC to Compel Google Inc. to Produce Complete Source Code for all Accused Instrumentalities by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Spangler, Andrew)
|
April 5, 2010 |
Filing 305
RESPONSE in Opposition re 288 Emergency SEALED MOTION (Expedited Motion to Amend Protective Order)Emergency SEALED MOTION (Expedited Motion to Amend Protective Order) filed by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Affidavit)(Wiley, Elizabeth)
|
April 1, 2010 |
Filing 306
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham: Markman Hearing held on 4/1/2010, Motion Hearing held on 4/1/2010 re 251 Interim SEALED MOTION by Bright Response, LLC to Compel Google Inc. to Produce Complete Source Code for all Accused Instrumentalities filed by Bright Response LLC, 252 SEALED MOTION to Compel Yahoo! Inc. to Comply with Court Order of November 5, 2009 and Produce Source Code in Native Format as Maintained in Ordinary Course of Business filed by Bright Response LLC. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign-in Sheet) (jml)
|
March 31, 2010 |
Filing 304
AMENDED JOINT CLAIM CONSTRUCTION CHART filed by AOL, LLC., America Online, Inc., Bright Response LLC, Google Inc., Yahoo!, Inc.. (Doan, Jennifer)
|
March 31, 2010 |
Filing 303
Defendants' Sealed Supplement to the Record on Claim Construction. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Perlson, David)
|
March 31, 2010 |
Filing 302
RESPONSE in Opposition re 301 MOTION (Request Regarding Trial Date) filed by Bright Response LLC. (Anderson, Patrick)
|
March 31, 2010 |
Filing 301
MOTION (Request Regarding Trial Date) by AOL, LLC., Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Jennifer)
|
March 31, 2010 |
Filing 300
ORDER granting 298 Motion for Leave to Supplement Invalidity Contentions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 3/31/2010. (ch, )
|
March 30, 2010 |
Filing 299
NOTICE of Hearing: Markman Hearing RESET for 4/1/2010, 08:30 AM, in Mag Ctrm (Marshall) before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham, with hearing on Docket Nos. 251 and 252 to follow immediately upon conclusion of the Markman. (delat)
|
March 30, 2010 |
Filing 298
Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File (Supplement Invalidity Contentions) by AOL, LLC., Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Jennifer)
|
March 24, 2010 |
Filing 297
ORDER granting 258 Sealed Motion for leave to Serve Supplemental Infringement Contentions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 3/24/2010. (ch, )
|
March 22, 2010 |
Filing 296
BRIGHT RESPONSE, LLC'S CLAIM CONSTRUCTION CHART filed by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Fenster, Marc)
|
March 22, 2010 |
Filing 295
DEFENDANTS' P.R. 4-5(d) CLAIM CONSTRUCTION CHART filed by AOL, LLC., America Online, Inc., Google Inc., Yahoo!, Inc.. (Perlson, David)
|
March 22, 2010 |
Filing 294
ORDER granting 293 Motion for Extension of Time to File Joint Claim Construction Chart. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 3/22/10. (ehs, )
|
March 19, 2010 |
Filing 293
Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File P.R. 4-5(d) Claim Construction Chart by AOL, LLC., America Online, Inc., Google Inc., Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
|
March 19, 2010 |
Filing 292
ORDER granting 289 Motion for Extension of Time to File Joint Claim Construction Chart. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 3/19/2010. (ch, )
|
March 18, 2010 |
Filing 291
SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 258 SEALED MOTION for Leave to Supplement Infringement Contentions as to Defendant Yahoo, Inc. filed by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Elizabeth Wiley)(Wiley, Elizabeth)
|
March 18, 2010 |
Filing 290
NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 252 SEALED MOTION to Compel Yahoo! Inc. to Comply with Court Order of November 5, 2009 and Produce Source Code in Native Format as Maintained in Ordinary Course of Business, 251 Interim SEALED MOTION by Bright Response, LLC to Compel Google Inc. to Produce Complete Source Code for all Accused Instrumentalities : Motion Hearing set for 4/1/2010 01:30 PM in Mag Ctrm (Marshall) before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham. (jml)
|
March 18, 2010 |
Filing 289
Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File P.R. 4-5(d) Joint Claim Construction Order by AOL, LLC., America Online, Inc., Google Inc., Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
|
March 17, 2010 |
Filing 288
Emergency SEALED MOTION (Expedited Motion to Amend Protective Order) by Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit 1, # 5 Exhibit 2, # 6 Exhibit 3, # 7 Exhibit 4, # 8 Exhibit 5, # 9 Exhibit 6, # 10 Exhibit 7, # 11 Exhibit 8, # 12 Exhibit 9, # 13 Exhibit 10, # 14 Exhibit 11, # 15 Exhibit 12, # 16 Exhibit 13)(Doan, Jennifer)
|
March 15, 2010 |
Filing 287
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham: Hotline Conference held on 3/15/2010. (Jan Lockhart, ECRO.) (jml)
|
March 15, 2010 |
Filing 286
NOTICE Resetting Hearing: Markman Hearing set for 4/1/2010 09:00 AM in Mag Ctrm (Marshall) before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham. (jml)
|
March 11, 2010 |
Filing 285
REPLY BRIEF REGARDING CLAIM CONSTRUCTION IN SUPPORT OF 253 Claim Construction Brief filed by Bright Response LLC. (Fenster, Marc)
|
March 10, 2010 |
Filing 284
SEALED MOTION for Expedited Consideration and Oral Hearing on Motion to Compel Yahoo! Inc.to Comply with Court Order (Dkt 252) by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Elizabeth Wiley, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Wiley, Elizabeth)
|
March 9, 2010 |
Filing 283
Unopposed MOTION for Hearing for Expedited Oral Hearing on Motion to Compel by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wiley, Elizabeth)
|
March 5, 2010 |
Filing 282
SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 258 SEALED MOTION for Leave to Supplement Infringement Contentions as to Defendant Yahoo, Inc. filed by Yahoo!, Inc.. (Defendant Yahoo! Inc.'s Response to Bright Response, LLC's Motion for Leave to Supplement its Infringement Contentions as to Defendant Yahoo! Inc.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Doan, Jennifer)
|
March 5, 2010 |
Filing 281
SEALED SURREPLY to Motion re 251 Interim SEALED MOTION by Bright Response, LLC to Compel Google Inc. to Produce Complete Source Code for all Accused Instrumentalities filed by Google Inc.. (Perlson, David)
|
March 5, 2010 |
Filing 280
ORDER granting 279 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 258 SEALED MOTION for Leave to Supplement Infringement Contentions as to Defendant Yahoo, Inc. Responses due by 3/5/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 3/5/2010. (ch, )
|
March 4, 2010 |
Filing 279
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Supplement Infringement Contentions as to Yahoo!, Inc. by Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Thane, Joshua)
|
March 1, 2010 |
Filing 278
ORDER granting 274 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Debera Wells Hepburn terminated as counsel for Bright Response LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 3/1/2010. (ch, )
|
March 1, 2010 |
Filing 277
ORDER granting 276 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 258 SEALED MOTION for Leave to Supplement Infringement Contentions as to Defendant Yahoo, Inc. Responses due by 3/4/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 3/1/2010. (ch, )
|
February 26, 2010 |
Filing 276
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Supplement Infringement Contentions as to Yahoo!, Inc. by Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Thane, Joshua)
|
February 26, 2010 |
Filing 275
RESPONSE to 253 Claim Construction Brief by AOL, LLC., America Online, Inc., Google Inc., Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Todd Kennedy, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, part 1, # 7 Exhibit 5, part 2, # 8 Exhibit 5, part 3, # 9 Exhibit 5, part 4, # 10 Exhibit 6, # 11 Exhibit 7, # 12 Exhibit 8, part 1, # 13 Exhibit 8, part 2, # 14 Exhibit 9, # 15 Exhibit 10)(Perlson, David)
|
February 26, 2010 |
Filing 274
Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hepburn, Debera)
|
February 26, 2010 |
Filing 273
Additional Attachments to Main Document: 272 MOTION Defendants' Joint Response Brief on Claim Construction.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, part 1, # 6 Exhibit 5, part 2, # 7 Exhibit 5, part 3, # 8 Exhibit 5, part 4, # 9 Exhibit 6, # 10 Exhibit 7, # 11 Exhibit 8, part 1, # 12 Errata 8, part 2, # 13 Exhibit 9, # 14 Exhibit 10)(Perlson, David)
|
February 26, 2010 |
***FILED IN ERROR. FILED UNDER WRONG EVENT Document # 272, Motion. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
|
February 25, 2010 |
Filing 272
***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE.*** MOTION Defendants' Joint Response Brief on Claim Construction by AOL, LLC., Google Inc., Yahoo!, Inc.. (Perlson, David) Modified on 2/26/2010 (ch, ).
|
February 25, 2010 |
Filing 271
SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 251 Interim SEALED MOTION by Bright Response, LLC to Compel Google Inc. to Produce Complete Source Code for all Accused Instrumentalities filed by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Elizabeth Wiley, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D)(Wiley, Elizabeth)
|
February 25, 2010 |
Filing 270
ORDER granting 269 Motion for Extension of Time to File Claim ConstructionBriefs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 2/25/10. (ehs, )
|
February 24, 2010 |
Filing 269
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Claim Construction Briefs by AOL, LLC., America Online, Inc., Bright Response LLC, Google Inc., Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
|
February 24, 2010 |
Filing 268
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney William C Rooklidge for Yahoo!, Inc. (RECEIPT 5-1-1873). (rml, )
|
February 24, 2010 |
Filing 267
ORDER granting 265 Motion for Extension of Time to File Claim Construction Briefs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 2/24/10. (ehs, )
|
February 24, 2010 |
Filing 266
ORDER granting 264 Motion for Extension of Time to File Claim Construction Briefs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 2/24/10. (ehs, )
|
February 23, 2010 |
Filing 265
Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Claim Construction Briefs by AOL, LLC., America Online, Inc., Google Inc., Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
|
February 23, 2010 |
Filing 264
Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Claim Construction Briefs by AOL, LLC., America Online, Inc., Google Inc., Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
|
February 23, 2010 |
Filing 263
SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 252 SEALED MOTION to Compel Yahoo! Inc. to Comply with Court Order of November 5, 2009 and Produce Source Code in Native Format as Maintained in Ordinary Course of Business filed by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Elizabeth Wiley, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Affidavit of Patrick Anderson)(Wiley, Elizabeth)
|
February 22, 2010 |
Filing 262
ORDER granting 261 Motion for Extension of Time to File Claim Construction Briefing. 1) Defendants are to comply with P.R. 4-5(b), their Claim Construction Opposition Brief by February 22, 2010. 2) Plaintiff Bright Response is to comply with P.R. 4-5(c), its Claim Construction Reply Brief Reply, by March 8, 2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 2/22/10. (ehs, )
|
February 17, 2010 |
Filing 261
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Claim Construction Briefing by AOL, LLC., America Online, Inc., Google Inc., Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Jennifer)
|
February 15, 2010 |
Filing 260
SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 251 Interim SEALED MOTION by Bright Response, LLC to Compel Google Inc. to Produce Complete Source Code for all Accused Instrumentalities filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Jennifer P. Ainsworth, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
|
February 12, 2010 |
Filing 259
SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 258 SEALED MOTION for Leave to Supplement Infringement Contentions as to Defendant Yahoo, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit D, # 2 Exhibit E, # 3 Exhibit F, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Wiley, Elizabeth)
|
February 12, 2010 |
Filing 258
SEALED MOTION for Leave to Supplement Infringement Contentions as to Defendant Yahoo, Inc. by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Affidavit, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C)(Wiley, Elizabeth)
|
February 12, 2010 |
Filing 257
ORDER granting 252 Sealed Motion to Extend Time to File its Response to Bright Responses Motion to Compel Google Inc. to Produce Complete Source Code for all Accused Instrumentalities (Motion to Compel) [Dkt #251]. Deadline extended to 2/15/10. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 2/12/10. (ehs, )
|
February 11, 2010 |
Filing 256
SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 252 SEALED MOTION to Compel Yahoo! Inc. to Comply with Court Order of November 5, 2009 and Produce Source Code in Native Format as Maintained in Ordinary Course of Business filed by Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 White Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit N)(Doan, Jennifer)
|
February 11, 2010 |
Filing 255
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 251 Interim SEALED MOTION by Bright Response, LLC to Compel Google Inc. to Produce Complete Source Code for all Accused Instrumentalities by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Jennifer)
|
February 8, 2010 |
Filing 254
ORDER granting 219 Motion for Leave to File Response to Bright Responses Motion to Compel Production of Source Code. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 2/8/10. (ehs, )
|
February 3, 2010 |
Filing 253
CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Thompson, Stanley)
|
January 25, 2010 |
Filing 252
SEALED MOTION to Compel Yahoo! Inc. to Comply with Court Order of November 5, 2009 and Produce Source Code in Native Format as Maintained in Ordinary Course of Business by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit N, # 16 Exhibit O, # 17 Exhibit P, # 18 Text of Proposed Order)(Wiley, Elizabeth)
|
January 25, 2010 |
Filing 251
SEALED MOTION by Bright Response, LLC to Compel Google Inc. to Produce Complete Source Code for all Accused Instrumentalities by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit N, # 16 Exhibit O, # 17 Text of Proposed Order)(Wiley, Elizabeth) Modified on 1/25/2010 (sm, ).
|
January 13, 2010 |
Filing 250
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 11/23/09 Motion Hearing before Judge Chad Everingham. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Susan Simmons, CSR,Telephone number: 903/935-3868. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 2/8/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/16/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/16/2010. (lss, )
|
January 4, 2010 |
Filing 249
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Elizabeth Stoebner Wiley on behalf of Bright Response LLC (Wiley, Elizabeth)
|
December 28, 2009 |
Filing 248
ORDER granting 247 Motion to Withdraw Motion to Compel Production of Documents and Privilege Logs from Plaintiff and Acclaim Financial Group, LLC (Dkt. #244). Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 12/28/09. (ehs, )
|
December 23, 2009 |
Filing 247
Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw 244 SEALED MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND PRIVILEGE LOGS FROM PLAINTIFF AND ACCLAIM FINANCIAL GROUP LLC by AOL, LLC., America Online, Inc., Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Jennifer)
|
December 23, 2009 |
Filing 246
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alan Wayne Brooks on behalf of Bright Response LLC (Brooks, Alan)
|
December 21, 2009 |
Filing 245
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alexander Chester Giza on behalf of Bright Response LLC (Giza, Alexander)
|
December 11, 2009 |
Filing 244
***WITHDRAWN PER ORDER # 248 *** SEALED MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND PRIVILEGE LOGS FROM PLAINTIFF AND ACCLAIM FINANCIAL GROUP LLC by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of David A. Perlson, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit N, # 16 Exhibit O, # 17 Exhibit P, # 18 Exhibit Q, # 19 Exhibit R, # 20 Exhibit S, # 21 Exhibit T, # 22 Exhibit U, # 23 Exhibit V, # 24 Exhibit W, # 25 Exhibit X, # 26 Exhibit Y, # 27 Exhibit Z, # 28 Exhibit AA, # 29 Exhibit BB, # 30 Exhibit CC, # 31 Exhibit DD, # 32 Exhibit EE, # 33 Exhibit FF, # 34 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David) Modified on 12/28/2009 (ehs, ).
|
November 24, 2009 |
Filing 243
ORDER granting 221 Motion for Leave to File; denying 222 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 12/24/09. (ehs, )
|
November 24, 2009 |
Filing 242
ORDER granting 240 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney John Frederick Bufe and Michael E Jones and Allen F Gardner terminated as counsel for Yahoo!. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 11/24/09. (ch, )
|
November 24, 2009 |
Filing 241
ORDER granting 235 Motion for leave to file Supplemental Reply to Motion to Modify the Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 11/24/09. (ch, )
|
November 23, 2009 |
Filing 240
Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Michael E. Jones, John F. Bufe, Allen F. Gardner and the Potter Minton, P.C. law firm as counsel by Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
|
November 23, 2009 |
Filing 239
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham: Motion Hearing held on 11/23/2009 re 222 MOTION for Protective Order Modification filed by Yahoo!, Inc., 221 MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Modify Protective Order filed by Yahoo!, Inc.. (Jan Lockhart, ECRO.) (Attachments: # 1 Sign-in Sheet) (jml)
|
November 23, 2009 |
Filing 238
Additional Attachments to Main Document: 237 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion,.. (White, Jason)
|
November 23, 2009 |
NOTICE FROM CLERK re 235 Unopposed SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Brief. This entry has been modified by clerk, per attys request, to be an unsealed motion. (sm, )
|
November 23, 2009 |
***FILED IN ERROR, PER ATTY (ATTY HAS REFILED - SEE #237). Document # 236, Sealed Supplemental Surreply. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (sm, )
|
November 21, 2009 |
Filing 237
***REPLACES #236***SEALED SUPPLEMENTAL SUR-REPLY to Response to Motion re 222 MOTION for Protective Order Modification filed by Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit White, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Affidavit Zent)(White, Jason) Modified on 11/23/2009 (sm, ).
|
November 20, 2009 |
Filing 236
***FILED IN ERROR, PER ATTY, PLEASE IGNORE.***SEALED SUPPLEMENTAL SUR-REPLY to Response to Motion re 222 MOTION for Protective Order Modification filed by Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit White, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Affidavit Zent)(White, Jason) Modified on 11/23/2009 (sm, ).
|
November 20, 2009 |
Filing 235
Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Brief (unsealed per atty's request) by Yahoo!, Inc.. (White, Jason) Modified on 11/23/2009 (sm, ).
|
November 20, 2009 |
Filing 234
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Alison E Monahan for Google Inc. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-1-5042. (ch, )
|
November 18, 2009 |
Filing 233
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Scott Andrews on behalf of Yahoo!, Inc. (Andrews, John)
|
November 18, 2009 |
Filing 232
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joshua Reed Thane on behalf of Yahoo!, Inc. (Thane, Joshua)
|
November 18, 2009 |
Filing 231
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jennifer Haltom Doan on behalf of Yahoo!, Inc. (Doan, Jennifer)
|
November 18, 2009 |
Filing 230
ORDER - the court orders Yahoo to comply with the protective order currently in place (Dkt. No. 134), and specifically Section 10(c), which states in part, The Producing Party shall make available a laser printer with commercially reasonable printing speeds for on-site printing during inspecti of the code. The court will address Yahoos motion for protective order modification (Dkt. No. 222) at a later date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 11/18/09. (ch, )
|
November 18, 2009 |
Filing 229
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of MOTION TO COMPEL Hearing held on 11/5/09 before Judge Chad Everingham. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR,Telephone number: (903) 663-5082. (24 pgs.)NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/9/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/21/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/16/2010. (tja, )
|
November 17, 2009 |
Filing 228
NOTICE of Hearing: Hearing on Yahoo! Inc.'s Motion to Modify the Protective Order (Dkt. #222) set for 11/23/2009, 09:30 AM, in Mag Ctrm (Marshall) before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham.(delat)
|
November 16, 2009 |
Filing 227
SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 222 MOTION for Protective Order Modification filed by Bright Response LLC. (Weiss, Andrew)
|
November 13, 2009 |
Filing 226
REPLY to Response to Motion re 222 MOTION for Protective Order Modification filed by Yahoo!, Inc.. (White, Jason)
|
November 9, 2009 |
Filing 225
NOTICE by Bright Response LLC re 224 Response in Opposition to Motion, of Emergency Request for Hearing, If Necessary (Weiss, Andrew)
|
November 9, 2009 |
Filing 224
RESPONSE in Opposition re 222 MOTION for Protective Order Modification AND REQUEST FOR EMERGENCY HEARING, IF NECESSARY filed by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Andrew D. Weiss, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C)(Weiss, Andrew)
|
November 5, 2009 |
Filing 223
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham: Motion Hearing held on 11/5/2009 re 195 SEALED MOTION to Compel Production of Source Code filed by Bright Response LLC. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR.) (Attachments: # 1 Sign-in Sheet) (jml)
|
November 5, 2009 |
Filing 222
MOTION for Protective Order Modification by Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit White Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(White, Jason)
|
November 5, 2009 |
Filing 221
MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Modify Protective Order by Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(White, Jason)
|
November 4, 2009 |
Filing 220
SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 195 SEALED MOTION to Compel Production of Source Code per 219 filed by Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10)(White, Jason)
|
November 4, 2009 |
Filing 219
MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply by Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(White, Jason)
|
November 4, 2009 |
Filing 218
***FILED IN ERROR. WRONG CASE. PLEASE IGNORE.*** MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply by Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(White, Jason) Modified on 11/4/2009 (ch, ).
|
November 4, 2009 |
***FILED IN ERROR. FILED IN WRONG CASE Document # 218, Motion for leave. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (Attorney will refile)(ch, )
|
November 4, 2009 |
***FILED IN ERROR. FILE UNDER WRONG EVENT Document # 217, Sur-Reply to Reply. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (Attorney must refile using the correct event)(ch, )
|
November 3, 2009 |
Filing 217
***FILED IN ERROR. FILED USING WRONG EVENT. PLEASE IGNORE.***SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 195 SEALED MOTION to Compel Production of Source Code filed by Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Affidavit, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6, # 9 Exhibit 7, # 10 Exhibit 8, # 11 Exhibit 9, # 12 Exhibit 10, # 13 Text of Proposed Order)(White, Jason) Modified on 11/4/2009 (ch, ).
|
October 23, 2009 |
Filing 216
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrew D Weiss on behalf of Bright Response LLC (Weiss, Andrew)
|
October 23, 2009 |
Filing 215
NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 195 SEALED MOTION to Compel Production of Source Code : Motion Hearing set for 11/5/2009 02:00 PM in Mag Ctrm (Marshall) before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham. (jml)
|
October 19, 2009 |
Filing 214
ORDER granting 213 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Ari Benjamin Rafilson terminated as counsel for pltf. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 10/19/09. (ehs, )
|
October 15, 2009 |
Filing 213
Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Ari Rafilson) by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Rafilson, Ari)
|
October 15, 2009 |
Filing 212
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Debera Wells Hepburn on behalf of Bright Response LLC (Hepburn, Debera)
|
September 30, 2009 |
Filing 211
NOTICE of Designation of Attorney in Charge to David A Perlson on behalf of AOL, LLC., America Online, Inc., Google Inc. (Perlson, David)
|
September 29, 2009 |
Filing 210
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 164 Motion for Protective Order. Ruling set forth herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 9/29/09. (ehs, )
|
September 28, 2009 |
Filing 209
SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 195 SEALED MOTION to Compel Production of Source Code filed by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Rafilson, Ari)
|
September 28, 2009 |
Filing 208
SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 194 SEALED MOTION for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions re Google Inc. filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Perlson, David)
|
September 28, 2009 |
Filing 207
ORDER granting 194 Sealed Motion to supplement its infringement contentions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 9/28/09. (ehs, )
|
September 28, 2009 |
Filing 206
ORDER granting 205 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. The deadline for compliance with Patent Rule 4.4 shall be extended until November 27, 2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 9/28/09. (ehs, )
|
September 28, 2009 |
***FILED IN ERROR, WRONG EVENT USED, ATTY MUST REFILE USING CORRECT EVENT. Document # 204, Sealed Document. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (sm, )
|
September 25, 2009 |
Filing 205
Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery pursuant to Patent Rule 4.4 by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
|
September 25, 2009 |
Filing 204
***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE.***Sealed Document. GOOGLE INC.'S SUR-REPLY IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT ITS INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Perlson, David) Modified on 9/28/2009 (sm, ).
|
September 16, 2009 |
Filing 203
SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 195 SEALED MOTION to Compel Production of Source Code filed by Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(White, Jason)
|
September 16, 2009 |
Filing 202
SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 194 SEALED MOTION for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions re Google Inc. filed by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Rafilson Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C)(Bustamante, John)
|
September 11, 2009 |
Filing 201
NOTICE by Bright Response LLC PR 4-3 Submission of the Parties (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex. A)(Thompson, Stanley)
|
September 11, 2009 |
Filing 200
ORDER granting 199 Motion for Extension of Time to File the Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement under P.R. 4-3. Deadline for Plaintiff and Defendants to file the Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement under P.R. 4-3 shall be extended until and through September 11, 2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 9/11/09. (ehs, )
|
September 9, 2009 |
Filing 199
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement Under P.R. 4-3 by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sistos, Antonio)
|
September 9, 2009 |
Filing 198
ORDER granting 197 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Parties will have through September 9, 2009 to comply with P.R. 4-3. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 9/9/09. (ehs, )
|
September 8, 2009 |
Filing 197
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File to Comply with PR 4-3 by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Thompson, Stanley)
|
September 3, 2009 |
Filing 196
SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 194 SEALED MOTION for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions re Google Inc. filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-1, # 2 Exhibit A-2, # 3 Exhibit B-1, # 4 Exhibit B-2, # 5 Exhibit B-3, # 6 Exhibit B-4, # 7 Exhibit C, # 8 Exhibit D, # 9 Exhibit E, # 10 Exhibit F-1, # 11 Exhibit F-2, # 12 Exhibit F-3, # 13 Exhibit F-4, # 14 Exhibit G, # 15 Exhibit H, # 16 Exhibit I, # 17 Exhibit J, # 18 Exhibit K, # 19 Exhibit L, # 20 Exhibit M, # 21 Exhibit N, # 22 Exhibit O, # 23 Exhibit P, # 24 Exhibit Q, # 25 Exhibit R, # 26 Exhibit S, # 27 Exhibit T, # 28 Exhibit U, # 29 Exhibit V)(Perlson, David)
|
September 1, 2009 |
Filing 195
SEALED MOTION to Compel Production of Source Code by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of Ari Rafilson, # 2 Exhibit A-1, # 3 Exhibit A-2, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G, # 10 Exhibit H, # 11 Exhibit I, # 12 Exhibit J, # 13 Exhibit K, # 14 Exhibit L, # 15 Exhibit M, # 16 Exhibit N, # 17 Exhibit O, # 18 Exhibit P, # 19 Exhibit Q, # 20 Exhibit R, # 21 Text of Proposed Order)(Rafilson, Ari)
|
August 17, 2009 |
Filing 194
SEALED MOTION for Leave to Supplement Infringement Contentions re Google Inc. by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Text of Proposed Order)(Rafilson, Ari) Modified on 8/18/2009 (rml, ).
|
August 13, 2009 |
Filing 193
ORDER granting 192 Agreed Motion to Withdraw 185 SEALED MOTION To Quash And For Protective Order To Preclude Depositions of Google's High-Level Executives filed by Google Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on August 13, 2009. (jml)
|
August 12, 2009 |
Filing 192
Agreed MOTION to Withdraw 185 SEALED MOTION To Quash And For Protective Order To Preclude Depositions of Google's High-Level Executives by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
|
August 12, 2009 |
Filing 191
ORDER granting 190 Motion for Extension to Comply with P.R. 4-3. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on August 12, 2009. (jml)
|
August 7, 2009 |
Filing 190
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File - To Comply with PR 4-3 by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fenster, Marc)
|
August 4, 2009 |
Filing 189
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Marcus Bustamante on behalf of Bright Response LLC (Bustamante, John)
|
July 31, 2009 |
Filing 188
ORDER granting 186 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Parties will have through August 6, 2009 to comply with P.R. 4-3.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/31/09. (ehs, )
|
July 31, 2009 |
Filing 187
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Rachel H Smith for Google Inc..(APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-1-4844) (ehs, )
|
July 30, 2009 |
Filing 186
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Spangler, Andrew)
|
July 28, 2009 |
Filing 185
SEALED MOTION To Quash And For Protective Order To Preclude Depositions of Google's High-Level Executives by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of David A. Perlson, # 2 Ex. 1 to Perlson Declaration, # 3 Exhibit Ex. 2 to Perlson Declaration, # 4 Exhibit Ex. 3 to Perlson Declaration, # 5 Exhibit Ex. 4 to Perlson Declaration, # 6 Exhibit Ex. 5 to Perlson Declaration, # 7 Exhibit Ex. 6 to Perlson Declaration, # 8 Exhibit Ex. 7 to Perlson Declaration, # 9 Exhibit Ex. 8 to Perlson Declaration, # 10 Exhibit Ex. 9 to Perlson Declaration, # 11 Exhibit Ex. 10 to Perlson Declaration, # 12 Exhibit Ex. 11 to Perlson Declaration, # 13 Exhibit Ex. 12 to Perlson Declaration, # 14 Exhibit Ex. 13 to Perlson Declaration, # 15 Exhibit Ex. 14 to Perlson Declaration, # 16 Exhibit Ex. 15 to Perlson Declaration, # 17 Exhibit Ex. 16 to Perlson Declaration, # 18 Exhibit Ex. 17 to Perlson Declaration, # 19 Exhibit Ex. 18 to Perlson Declaration, # 20 Exhibit Ex. 19 to Perlson Declaration, # 21 Exhibit Ex. 20 to Perlson Declaration, # 22 Exhibit Ex. 21 to Perlson Declaration, # 23 Exhibit Ex. 22 to Perlson Declaration, # 24 Exhibit Ex. 23 to Perlson Declaration, # 25 Exhibit Ex. 24 to Perlson Declaration, # 26 Exhibit Ex. 25 to Perlson Declaration, # 27 Exhibit Ex. 26 to Perlson Declaration, # 28 Exhibit Declaration of Marissa Mayer, # 29 Exhibit Ex. A to Mayer Declaration, # 30 Exhibit Declaration of Udi Manber, # 31 Exhibit Declaration of Doug Garland, # 32 Exhibit Declaration of Salar Kamangar, # 33 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
|
July 15, 2009 |
Filing 184
ORDER granting 156 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney David A Perlson for America Online, Inc.. Attorney C.J. Alice Chuang; Michael J Sacksteder; Saina Shamilov; Darryl M Woo; Tyler Alexander Baker and Eric Ball terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/15/09. (ehs, )
|
July 9, 2009 |
Filing 183
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Stanley H Thompson, Jr for Bright Response LLC. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-1-4804 (ch, )
|
July 9, 2009 |
***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 182, Notice of Attorney Appearance. PLEASE IGNORE. ATTORNEY MUST FILE A PHV*** (ljw, )
|
July 8, 2009 |
Filing 182
PLEASE IGNORE, ATTORNEY IS NOT ADMITTED IN THE EASTERN DISTRICT, MUST FILE A PHV APPLICATION NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stanley H Thompson, Jr on behalf of Bright Response LLC (Thompson, Stanley) Modified on 7/9/2009 (ljw, ).
|
June 16, 2009 |
Filing 181
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Marc A Fenster on behalf of Bright Response LLC (Fenster, Marc)
|
June 16, 2009 |
Filing 180
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ari Benjamin Rafilson on behalf of Bright Response LLC (Rafilson, Ari)
|
June 8, 2009 |
Filing 179
ORDER granting 178 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney John J Edmonds terminated as counsel for the Plaintiffs Bright Response LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/8/09. (ch, )
|
June 2, 2009 |
Filing 178
Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (John Edmonds) by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Edmonds, John)
|
May 20, 2009 |
Filing 177
ORDER granting 175 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jamena Scott-Pirone terminated as counsel for Google Inc and AOL LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 5/20/09. (ehs, )
|
May 18, 2009 |
Filing 176
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Britt H Evangelist for Google Inc. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-1-4694. (ch, )
|
May 18, 2009 |
Filing 175
Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Jamena Scott-Pirone) by AOL, LLC., Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Jennifer)
|
May 14, 2009 |
Filing 174
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Eugene Novikov for Google Inc. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-1-4685. (ch, )
|
January 2, 2009 |
Filing 173
SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 164 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Bright Response LLC. (Edmonds, John)
|
December 19, 2008 |
Filing 172
ORDER granting 169 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jonathan T Suder; Karolyne Hu Cheng and Michael T Cooke terminated as counsel for Bright Response LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 12/19/08. (ch, )
|
December 19, 2008 |
Filing 171
ORDER granting 168 Motion for Extension of Time to File. 1) Defendant Googles Reply brief regarding the Motion for Protective Order is to be filed by December 18, 2008. 2) Plaintiff Bright Responses Sur-Reply brief regarding the Motion for Protective Order is to be filed by January 2, 2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 12/19/08. (ch, )
|
December 18, 2008 |
Filing 170
RESPONSE in Support re 164 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Google Inc.. (Perlson, David)
|
December 16, 2008 |
Filing 169
Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Spangler, Andrew)
|
December 15, 2008 |
Filing 168
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File (Joint Motion to Extend Deadlines Regarding Google's Motion for Protective Order [Dkt #164] by Bright Response LLC, Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Jennifer)
|
December 5, 2008 |
Filing 167
RESPONSE in Opposition re 164 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Edmonds, John)
|
December 4, 2008 |
Filing 166
ORDER granting 165 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Google, Inc.s Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 12/4/08. (ehs, )
|
December 2, 2008 |
Filing 165
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 164 MOTION for Protective Order by Bright Response LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Edmonds, John)
|
November 18, 2008 |
Filing 164
MOTION for Protective Order by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Jennifer)
|
October 27, 2008 |
Filing 163
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney David Taylor Rudolph for AOL, LLC. and America Online, Inc. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 2-1-4188. (ch, )
|
October 27, 2008 |
Filing 162
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Brian C Cannon for Google Inc.. (APPROVED FEE PAID 2-1-4181)(ehs, )
|
October 27, 2008 |
Filing 161
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Andrea Pallios Roberts for Google Inc..(APPROVED FEE PAID 2-1-4181) (ehs, )
|
October 2, 2008 |
Filing 160
ORDER granting 159 Motion to modify the style of this case. Clerk shall take note that the style of this case is now: "Bright Response, LLC vs Google, Inc. et al". Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 10/2/08. (ehs, )
|
September 30, 2008 |
Filing 159
Consent MOTION Modify Case Style by Polaris IP, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Edmonds, John)
|
September 23, 2008 |
Filing 158
ORDER denying 37 Motion to Dismiss; denying 39 Motion to Dismiss; denying 40 Motion to Dismiss; denying 41 Motion for More Definite Statement; denying 42 Motion for More Definite Statement; denying 43 Motion for More Definite Statement; denying 43 Motion to Stay; denying 43 Motion to Strike. For the reasons stated herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 9/23/08. (ch, )
|
September 22, 2008 |
Filing 157
ORDER granting 149 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Harry Lee Gillam, Jr terminated as counsel for Dft AOL, LLC., and America Online, Inc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 9/22/08. (ch, )
|
September 19, 2008 |
Filing 156
Consent MOTION to Substitute Attorney by AOL, LLC., America Online, Inc., Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Jennifer)
|
September 19, 2008 |
Filing 155
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jennifer Parker Ainsworth on behalf of AOL, LLC., America Online, Inc. (Ainsworth, Jennifer)
|
September 18, 2008 |
Filing 154
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Charles K Verhoeven for AOL, LLC., Google Inc. and AOL, LLC..(FEE PAID) 2-1-4083 (ehs, )
|
September 18, 2008 |
Filing 153
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Antonio Sistos for AOL, LLC., Google Inc. and AOL, LLC..(FEE PAID) 2-1-4079 (ehs, )
|
September 18, 2008 |
Filing 149
Consent MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by AOL, LLC., America Online, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gillam, Harry)
|
September 18, 2008 |
Filing 148
ORDER granting 147 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Kajeer Yar terminated as attorney of record for Polaris IP, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 9/18/08. (ch, )
|
September 17, 2008 |
Filing 147
Consent MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Polaris IP, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Yar, Kajeer)
|
September 10, 2008 |
Filing 152
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney David A Perlson for AOL, LLC. and Google Inc. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 2-1-4077. (ch, )
|
September 10, 2008 |
Filing 151
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Jennifer A Kash for AOL, LLC. and Google Inc. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 2-1-4076. (ch, )
|
September 10, 2008 |
Filing 150
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Jamena Scott-Pirone for AOL, LLC. and Google Inc. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 2-1-4075. (ch, )
|
September 8, 2008 |
Filing 146
RESPONSE to 143 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim Plaintiff's Reply to the Counterclaims of AOL, Inc. and America Online, Inc. by Polaris IP, LLC. (Cooke, Michael)
|
September 8, 2008 |
Filing 145
RESPONSE to 142 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim Plaintiff's Reply to the Counterclaims of Google, Inc. by Polaris IP, LLC. (Cooke, Michael)
|
September 8, 2008 |
Filing 144
RESPONSE to 141 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim Plaintiff's Reply to the Counterclaims of Yahoo! Inc. by Polaris IP, LLC. (Cooke, Michael)
|
August 20, 2008 |
Filing 143
Defendants AOL LLC and America Online, Inc.'s ANSWER to 129 Amended Complaint , Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against Polaris IP, LLC by AOL, LLC., America Online, Inc..(Woo, Darryl)
|
August 20, 2008 |
Filing 142
Defendant Google Inc.'s ANSWER to 129 Amended Complaint , Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against Polaris IP, LLC by Google Inc..(Woo, Darryl)
|
August 20, 2008 |
Filing 141
Defendant Yahoo Inc.'s ANSWER to 129 Amended Complaint , Affirmative Defenses, and, COUNTERCLAIM against Polaris IP, LLC by Yahoo!, Inc..(White, Jason)
|
August 19, 2008 |
Filing 140
ORDER granting 139 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Deadline extended to 10/14/08. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 8/19/08. (ehs, )
|
August 15, 2008 |
Filing 139
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and Allow for Amendment of the Parties' Infringement and Invalidity Contentions by AOL, LLC., America Online, Inc., Google Inc., Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Woo, Darryl)
|
August 8, 2008 |
Filing 138
NOTICE of Disclosure by AOL, LLC., America Online, Inc. of AOL, LLC's and America Online, Inc.'s P.R. 3-3 & 3-4 Disclosures (Woo, Darryl)
|
August 8, 2008 |
Filing 137
NOTICE of Disclosure by Google Inc. of Google Inc.'s P.R. 3-3 & 3-4 Disclosures (Woo, Darryl)
|
August 7, 2008 |
Filing 136
NOTICE of Disclosure by Yahoo!, Inc. of Yahoo's P.R. 3-3 & 3-4 Disclosures (White, Jason)
|
August 5, 2008 |
Filing 135
ORDER granting 132 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answer deadline extended to 8/20/08 for defts Google Inc., Yahoo! Inc., AOL LLC and America Online Inc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 8/5/08. (ehs, )
|
August 5, 2008 |
Answer Due Deadline Updated for AOL, LLC. to 8/20/2008; America Online, Inc. to 8/20/2008; Google Inc. to 8/20/2008; Yahoo!, Inc. to 8/20/2008. (ehs, )
|
July 30, 2008 |
Filing 134
AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/30/08. (ch, )
|
July 25, 2008 |
Filing 133
Consent MOTION for Protective Order by Polaris IP, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Edmonds, John)
|
July 24, 2008 |
Filing 132
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 129 Amended Complaint or Otherwise Respond to Amended Complaint by AOL, LLC., America Online, Inc., Google Inc., Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Ball, Eric)
|
July 23, 2008 |
Filing 131
ORDER granting 126 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Darryl M Woo for AOL, LLC. and America Online, Inc., Michael J Sacksteder for AOL, LLC. and America Online, Inc., Tyler Alexander Baker for AOL, LLC. and America Online, Inc., Saina Shamilov for AOL, LLC. and America Online, Inc., Eric Ball for AOL, LLC. and America Online, Inc., C.J. Alice Chuang for AOL, LLC. and America Online, Inc.. Attorney Victoria Fishman Maroulis; Antonio Sistos; Kevin A Smith; Charles K Verhoeven; Matthew D Cannon and Jennifer A Kash terminated as counsel for AOL, LLC and America Online, Inc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/23/08. (ch, )
|
July 23, 2008 |
Filing 130
ORDER granting 127 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney J Mike Amerson and Danny Lloyd Williams terminated as counsel for Bright Response, LLC formerly known as Polaris IP, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/23/08. (ch, )
|
July 21, 2008 |
Filing 129
AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended Complaint for Patent Infringement against all defendants, filed by Polaris IP, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Edmonds, John)
|
July 21, 2008 |
Filing 128
ORDER granting 125 Motion to Amend Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/21/08. (ch, )
|
July 21, 2008 |
Filing 127
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR WITHDRAWAL OF REPRESENTATION) by Polaris IP, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Danny)
|
July 21, 2008 |
Filing 126
MOTION to Substitute Attorney by AOL, LLC., America Online, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Order Substituting Counsel)(Ball, Eric) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/22/2008: # 2 Revised Proposed Order) (mpv, ).
|
July 18, 2008 |
Filing 125
Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct Unopposed Motion by Plaintiff for Leave to Amend Complaint by Polaris IP, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Edmonds, John)
|
July 16, 2008 |
Filing 124
***FILED IN ERROR; PLEASE IGNORE***Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct Unopposed Motion by Plaintiff for Leave to Amend Complaint by Polaris IP, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 1A)(Edmonds, John) Modified on 7/16/2008 (mpv, ).
|
July 16, 2008 |
***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 124, Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct Unopposed Motion by Plaintiff for Leave to Amend Complaint by Polaris IP, LLC. PLEASE IGNORE. Incorrect pdf attached as Exhibit 1; attorney to correct and refile.*** (mpv, )
|
July 14, 2008 |
Filing 123
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Karolyne Hu Cheng on behalf of Polaris IP, LLC (Cheng, Karolyne)
|
July 14, 2008 |
Filing 122
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jonathan T Suder on behalf of Polaris IP, LLC (Suder, Jonathan)
|
July 14, 2008 |
Filing 121
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael T Cooke on behalf of Polaris IP, LLC (Cooke, Michael)
|
June 30, 2008 |
Filing 120
ORDER granting 119 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Kevin Patariu, Laura Beth Miller and Mircea A Tipescu terminated as counsel for Dft Yahoo!, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/30/08. (ch, )
|
June 26, 2008 |
Filing 119
Consent MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney L. Miller, K. Patariu, and M. Tipescu by Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
|
June 23, 2008 |
Filing 118
NOTICE of Change of Address by Michael Edwin Jones (Jones, Michael)
|
June 23, 2008 |
Filing 117
ORDER granting 116 Motion to Dismiss. All claims asserted between Plaintiff and IAC/InteractiveCorp and IAC Search and Media, Inc. are hereby dismissed with prejudice. All attorney fees and costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 6/20/08. (ch, )
|
June 19, 2008 |
Filing 116
Consent MOTION to Dismiss IAC/InteractiveCorp and IAC Search and Media, Inc. by Polaris IP, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Edmonds, John)
|
June 11, 2008 |
Filing 115
DOCKET CONTROL ORDER - Joinder of Parties due by 12/7/2008. Markman Hearing set for 3/31/2010 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham. Motions due by 6/22/2010. Pretrial Order due by 6/11/2010. Jury Selection set for 7/6/2010 09:00AM before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham. Pretrial Conference set for 6/29/2010 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/11/08. (ehs, )
|
June 11, 2008 |
Filing 114
DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/11/08. (ehs, )
|
June 9, 2008 |
Filing 113
Joint MOTION Joint Motion for Entry of Proposed Docket Control Order and Discovery Order by AOL, LLC., America Online, Inc., IAC/Interactivecorp, IAC Search and Media, Inc., Polaris IP, LLC, Google Inc., Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Docket Control Order, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Discovery Order)(Chuang, C.J. Alice)
|
June 9, 2008 |
Filing 112
ORDER granting 109 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Plaintiffs deadline to submit its P.R. 3-1 and 3-2 Infringement Contentions as IAC is extended until and including 6/20/08. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/9/08. (ch, )
|
June 9, 2008 |
***FILED IN ERROR. Document # #110 and #111, NOTICE by Google Inc. Discovery Order-Certificate of Service and NOTICE by Google Inc. Docket Control Order - Certificate of Service. PLEASE IGNORE. Proposed orders are not filed as separate documents. Attorney must file a motion for entry of the discovery and scheduling orders and attach the proposed orders as separate attachment. Attorney to remove the Certificate of Service page from the proposed orders before attaching them. Certificate of Service should be included with the motion*** (mpv, )
|
June 6, 2008 |
Filing 111
***FILED IN ERROR; PLEASE IGNORE***NOTICE by Google Inc. Docket Control Order - Certificate of Service (Chuang, C.J. Alice) Modified on 6/9/2008 (mpv, ).
|
June 6, 2008 |
Filing 110
***FILED IN ERROR; PLEASE IGNORE***NOTICE by Google Inc. Discovery Order-Certificate of Service (Chuang, C.J. Alice) Modified on 6/9/2008 (mpv, ).
|
June 6, 2008 |
Filing 109
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Polaris IP, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Edmonds, John)
|
June 5, 2008 |
Filing 108
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Frederick Bufe on behalf of Yahoo!, Inc. (Bufe, John)
|
June 2, 2008 |
Filing 107
ORDER granting 104 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Deadlines are set forth herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/2/08. (ch, )
|
June 2, 2008 |
Filing 106
ORDER granting 105 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The parties have until 6/6/08 to file an agreed Docket Control Order and Discovery Order with the court and that the P.R. 3-1 and 3-2 Infringement Contentions are also due on 6/6/08. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/2/08. (ch, )
|
May 30, 2008 |
Filing 105
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File an Agreed Docket Control Order and Discovery Order and for Plaintiff to Comply With P.R. 3-1 and 3.2 by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit [Proposed] Order)(Chuang, C.J. Alice)
|
May 30, 2008 |
Filing 104
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Agreed Docket Control Order and Discovery Order by Polaris IP, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Edmonds, John)
|
May 30, 2008 |
***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 103, Joint Motion. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (Attorney will refile)(ch, )
|
May 29, 2008 |
Filing 103
***FILED IN ERROR. ATTORNEY WILL REFILE CORRECTED DOCUMENT***Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File regarding Submission of Agreed Docket Control and Discovery Orders by AOL, LLC., America Online, Inc., IAC/Interactivecorp, IAC Search and Media, Inc., Polaris IP, LLC, Google Inc., Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael) Modified on 5/30/2008 (ch, ). Modified on 5/30/2008 (ch, ). Modified on 5/30/2008 (ch, ).
|
May 16, 2008 |
Filing 102
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Darryl M Woo on behalf of Google Inc. (Woo, Darryl)
|
May 16, 2008 |
Filing 101
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Tyler Alexander Baker on behalf of Google Inc. (Baker, Tyler)
|
May 16, 2008 |
Filing 100
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Saina Shamilov on behalf of Google Inc. (Shamilov, Saina)
|
May 16, 2008 |
Filing 99
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by C.J. Alice Chuang on behalf of Google Inc. (Chuang, C.J. Alice)
|
May 16, 2008 |
Filing 98
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric Ball on behalf of Google Inc. (Ball, Eric)
|
May 16, 2008 |
Filing 97
ORDER granting 96 Motion for Extension of Time to File proposed docket control order and proposed discovery order. Deadline extended to 5/30/08. Signed by Judge Charles Everingham on 5/16/08. (ehs, )
|
May 15, 2008 |
Filing 96
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Docket Control Order by Polaris IP, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Spangler, Andrew)
|
May 14, 2008 |
Filing 95
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael J Sacksteder on behalf of Google Inc. (Sacksteder, Michael)
|
May 2, 2008 |
Filing 92
ORDER granting 91 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Amy Elizabeth LaValle terminated as counsel for Polaris. Signed by Judge Charles Everingham on 5/1/08. (ch, )
|
May 1, 2008 |
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge T. John Ward and Judge Charles Everingham: Status Conference held on 5/1/08. Counsel for the parties appeared and were asked if they consented to Judge Everingham. Depending on their answer, they were then given Markman and jury selection dates for the appropriate court. The parties are to meet and confer regarding a scheduling order and discovery order, and the parties have 14 days to submit the proposed orders. Court adjourned. (Court Reporter Susan Simmons.)(delat)
|
May 1, 2008 |
Filing 94
ORDER assigning case to Judge Everingham by consent of the parties for all further proceedings and entry of judgment. Signed by Judge Charles Everingham on 5/1/08. (ch, )
|
May 1, 2008 |
Filing 93
CONSENT to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham. (ch, )
|
May 1, 2008 |
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge T. John Ward and Judge Charles Everingham: Status Conference held on 5/01/08. Counsel for the parties appeared and were asked if they consented to Judge Everingham. Depending on their answer, they were then given Markman and jury selection dates for the appropriate court. The parties are to meet and confer regarding a scheduling order and discovery order, and the parties have 14 days to submit the proposed orders. Court adjourned. (Court Reporter Susan Simmons.) (shd, )
|
April 30, 2008 |
Filing 91
Consent MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Polaris IP, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(LaValle, Amy)
|
April 30, 2008 |
Filing 90
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Patrick Rolf Anderson on behalf of Polaris IP, LLC (Anderson, Patrick)
|
April 30, 2008 |
Filing 89
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Harry Lee Gillam, Jr on behalf of AOL, LLC., America Online, Inc. (Gillam, Harry)
|
April 11, 2008 |
Filing 88
ORDER - This case is set for a Status Conference on May 1, 2008. In keeping with the Court's recent practice, the Court intends to give the parties an opportunity, following the conference, to reach agreements on the Docket Control Order and Discovery Order without having to return for an additional conference with the Court. Accordingly, the Court orders that disclosures under P. R. 3-1 and P. R. 3-2 are due on Friday, May 16, 2008. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 4/11/08. (ehs, )
|
April 11, 2008 |
Filing 87
ORDER - This case is set for a Status Conference on May 1, 2008. In keeping with the Court's recent practice, the Court intends to give the parties an opportunity, following the conference, to reach agreements on the Docket Control Order and Discovery Order without having to return for an additional conference with the Court. Accordingly, the Court orders that disclosures under P. R. 3-1 and P. R. 3-2 are due on Friday, May 16, 2008.. Signed by Judge Charles Everingham on 4/11/08 (ehs, )
|
April 8, 2008 |
Filing 86
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Matthew D Cannon for AOL, LLC. and America Online, Inc. IAC/InterActive Corp. and IAC Search and Media, Inc. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 2-1-3679 (ch, )
|
April 3, 2008 |
Filing 85
ORDER - The purpose of the conference will be to assign a claim construction hearing date and a trial setting. The parties shallbe prepared to inform the Court whether they will consent to trial before the Magistrate Judge. Status Conference set for 5/1/2008 10:15 AM before Judge T. John Ward. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 4/3/08. (ehs, )
|
April 2, 2008 |
Filing 84
ORDER granting 76 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Added attorney Charles K Verhoeven for IAC/Interactivecorp and IAC Search and Media, Inc., Jennifer A Kash for IAC/Interactivecorp,IAC Search and Media, Inc., Kevin A Smith for IAC/Interactivecorp,IAC Search and Media, Inc., Antonio Sistos for IAC/Interactivecorp,IAC Search and Media, Inc.. Attorney Michael A Jacobs terminated as counsel for IAC/InterActive Corp, and IAC Search and Media, Inc.. Signed by Judge Charles Everingham on 4/2/08. (ch, )
|
April 2, 2008 |
Filing 83
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrew Wesley Spangler on behalf of Polaris IP, LLC (Spangler, Andrew)
|
February 26, 2008 |
Filing 82
ORDER granting 81 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Eric M. Albritton terminated as Counsel of Record. Signed by Judge Charles Everingham on 2/26/08. (ch, )
|
February 22, 2008 |
Filing 81
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Polaris IP, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Albritton, Eric)
|
February 21, 2008 |
Filing 80
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by J Mike Amerson on behalf of Polaris IP, LLC (Amerson, J)
|
February 21, 2008 |
Filing 79
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Danny Lloyd Williams on behalf of Polaris IP, LLC (Williams, Danny)
|
January 30, 2008 |
Filing 78
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daniel Francisco Perez on behalf of Polaris IP, LLC (Perez, Daniel)
|
January 29, 2008 |
Filing 77
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Amy Elizabeth LaValle on behalf of Polaris IP, LLC (LaValle, Amy)
|
January 25, 2008 |
Filing 76
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Motion to Substitute Counsel by IAC/Interactivecorp, IAC Search and Media, Inc.. (Smith, Kevin) Additional attachment(s) Certificate of Conference and Proposed Order added on 1/29/2008 (mpv, ). Modified on 1/29/2008 (mpv, ).
|
January 25, 2008 |
Filing 75
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Kevin A Smith for AOL, LLC. and America Online, Inc. IAC/InterActiveCorp., IAC Search and Media, Inc. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 2-1-3444 (ch, )
|
January 25, 2008 |
Filing 74
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Jennifer A Kash for AOL, LLC. and America Online, Inc. IAC/InterActiveCorp., IAC Search and Media Inc. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 2-1-3444 (ch, )
|
January 25, 2008 |
Filing 73
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Antonio Sistos for AOL, LLC. and America Online, Inc. IAC/InterActive Corp., IAC Search and Media, Inc. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 2-1-3444(ch, )
|
January 25, 2008 |
Filing 72
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Charles K Verhoeven for AOL, LLC. and America Online, Inc. IAC/InterActiveCorp, IAC Search and Media, Inc.(APPROVED)(FEE PAID)2-1-3444 (ch, )
|
January 24, 2008 |
Filing 71
ORDER granting 70 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jason Woodard Cook terminated as plaintiffs counsel of record. Signed by Judge Charles Everingham on 1/24/08. (ch, )
|
January 22, 2008 |
Filing 70
Consent MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Polaris IP, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cook, Jason)
|
November 28, 2007 |
Filing 69
ORDER granting 65 Motion to Dismiss defts Amazon.com, Inc., A9.com, Inc. Borders, Inc and Borders Group Inc with prejudice. All attorneys' fees and costs are to be borne by the party that incurred then. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 11/28/07. (ehs, )
|
November 26, 2007 |
Filing 68
SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 37 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative, for More Definite Statement, 41 MOTION for More Definite Statement by Yahoo filed by Polaris IP, LLC. (Edmonds, John)
|
November 23, 2007 |
Filing 67
SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 43 MOTION for More Definite Statement MOTION to Stay MOTION to Strike, 40 MOTION to Dismiss the complaint by AOL filed by Polaris IP, LLC. (Edmonds, John)
|
November 23, 2007 |
Filing 66
SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 39 MOTION to Dismiss or, In the Alternative, for a More Definite Statement; Motion to Strike, and Motion to Stay Discovery; and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof, 42 MOTION for More Definite Statement by Google filed by Polaris IP, LLC. (Edmonds, John)
|
November 23, 2007 |
Filing 65
Consent MOTION to Dismiss Amazon, A9 and Borders by Polaris IP, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Edmonds, John)
|
November 19, 2007 |
Filing 64
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Mircea A Tipescu for Yahoo!, Inc.. (FEE PAID) 6-1-11806 (ehs, )
|
November 19, 2007 |
Filing 63
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Kevin Patariu for Yahoo!, Inc.. (FEE PAID) 6-1-11806(ehs, )
|
November 15, 2007 |
Filing 62
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Yahoo!, Inc. identifying none as Corporate Parent. (White, Jason)
|
November 15, 2007 |
Filing 61
REPLY to Response to Motion re 37 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative, for More Definite Statement filed by Yahoo!, Inc.. (White, Jason)
|
November 13, 2007 |
Filing 60
REPLY to Response to Motion re 40 MOTION to Dismiss the complaint filed by AOL, LLC., America Online, Inc.. (Maroulis, Victoria)
|
November 13, 2007 |
Filing 59
REPLY to Response to Motion re 39 MOTION to Dismiss or, In the Alternative, for a More Definite Statement; Motion to Strike, and Motion to Stay Discovery; and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Google Inc.. (Ainsworth, Jennifer)
|
November 12, 2007 |
Filing 58
RESPONSE to 32 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of A9.com, Inc. by Polaris IP, LLC. (Cook, Jason)
|
November 12, 2007 |
Filing 57
RESPONSE to 33 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Amazon.com, Inc. by Polaris IP, LLC. (Cook, Jason)
|
November 12, 2007 |
Filing 56
RESPONSE to 34 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Borders, Inc. and Borders Group, Inc. by Polaris IP, LLC. (Cook, Jason)
|
November 12, 2007 |
Filing 55
RESPONSE to 35 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of IAC/Interactive Corp and IAC Search and Media, Inc. by Polaris IP, LLC. (Cook, Jason)
|
November 7, 2007 |
Filing 54
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Collin Michael Maloney on behalf of IAC/Interactivecorp, IAC Search and Media, Inc. (Maloney, Collin)
|
November 7, 2007 |
Filing 53
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Otis W Carroll, Jr on behalf of IAC/Interactivecorp, IAC Search and Media, Inc. (Carroll, Otis)
|
November 5, 2007 |
Filing 52
RESPONSE in Opposition re 43 MOTION for More Definite Statement MOTION to Stay MOTION to Strike, 40 MOTION to Dismiss the complaint filed by Polaris IP, LLC. (Edmonds, John)
|
November 5, 2007 |
Filing 51
RESPONSE in Opposition re 39 MOTION to Dismiss or, In the Alternative, for a More Definite Statement; Motion to Strike, and Motion to Stay Discovery; and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Polaris IP, LLC. (Edmonds, John)
|
November 5, 2007 |
Filing 50
RESPONSE in Opposition re 37 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative, for More Definite Statement filed by Polaris IP, LLC. (Edmonds, John)
|
November 2, 2007 |
Filing 49
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Google Inc. identifying none as Corporate Parent. (Ainsworth, Jennifer)
|
October 24, 2007 |
Filing 48
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by AOL, LLC., America Online, Inc. identifying Time Warner, Inc.; AOL Holdings, LLC; TW AOL Holdings Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Maroulis, Victoria)
|
October 22, 2007 |
Filing 47
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Borders Group, Inc. identifying None as Corporate Parent. (Erskine, Blake) Modified on 10/22/2007 (mpv, ).
|
October 22, 2007 |
Filing 46
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Borders, Inc. identifying Borders Group, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Erskine, Blake)
|
October 22, 2007 |
Filing 45
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Amazon.com, Inc. identifying Legg Mason Inc as Corporate Parent. (Erskine, Blake) Modified on 10/22/2007 (mpv, ).
|
October 22, 2007 |
Filing 44
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by A9.com, Inc. identifying Amazon.com as Corporate Parent. (Erskine, Blake)
|
October 19, 2007 |
Filing 43
MOTION for More Definite Statement, MOTION to Stay Discovery Obligations, MOTION to Strike CONTAINED IN # 40 by AOL, LLC.. (mpv, )
|
October 19, 2007 |
Filing 42
MOTION for More Definite Statement CONTAINED IN # 39 by Google Inc.. (mpv, )
|
October 19, 2007 |
Filing 41
MOTION for More Definite Statement CONTAINED IN # 37 by Yahoo!, Inc.. (mpv, )
|
October 19, 2007 |
Filing 40
MOTION to Dismiss the complaint by AOL, LLC., America Online, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Maroulis, Victoria)
|
October 19, 2007 |
Filing 39
MOTION to Dismiss or, In the Alternative, for a More Definite Statement; Motion to Strike, and Motion to Stay Discovery; and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Jennifer)
|
October 19, 2007 |
Filing 38
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Jason C White for Yahoo!, Inc.. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 6-1-11451(ch, )
|
October 19, 2007 |
Filing 37
MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative, for More Definite Statement by Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
|
October 18, 2007 |
Filing 36
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (NO PARENT CORPORATION) filed by IAC/Interactivecorp, IAC Search and Media, Inc. (Jacobs, Michael) Modified on 10/19/2007 (sm, ).
|
October 18, 2007 |
Filing 35
Defendants IAC/InterActiveCorp's and IAC Search and Media, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and, COUNTERCLAIM against Polaris IP, LLC by IAC/Interactivecorp, IAC Search and Media, Inc..(Jacobs, Michael)
|
October 18, 2007 |
Filing 34
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against Polaris IP, LLC by Borders, Inc., Borders Group, Inc..(Erskine, Blake)
|
October 18, 2007 |
Filing 33
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against Polaris IP, LLC by Amazon.com, Inc..(Erskine, Blake)
|
October 18, 2007 |
Filing 32
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against Polaris IP, LLC by A9.com, Inc..(Erskine, Blake)
|
October 17, 2007 |
Filing 31
E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Polaris IP, LLC. Amazon.com, Inc. served on 9/12/2007, answer due 10/18/2007. (ehs, )
|
October 2, 2007 |
Filing 30
ORDER granting 29 Motion for Extension of Time to answer. Dft Amazon.com, A9.com Inc. Borders, Inc. and Borders Group, Inc. are extended to 10/18/07. Signed by Judge Charles Everingham on 10/2/07. (ch, )
|
October 2, 2007 |
Answer Due Deadline Updated for Amazon.com, Inc. to 10/18/2007; A9.com, Inc. to 10/18/2007; Borders, Inc. to 10/18/2007; Borders Group, Inc. to 10/18/2007. (ch, ) Modified on 10/2/2007 (ch, ).
|
October 1, 2007 |
Filing 29
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (Unopposed) to Plaintiff Polaris IP, LLC's Original Complaint by Amazon.com, Inc., A9.com, Inc., Borders, Inc., Borders Group, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baker, Tyler)
|
September 19, 2007 |
Filing 28
ORDER granting 26 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Yahoo! Inc. deadline is extended to 10/19/07 . Signed by Judge Charles Everingham on 9/19/07. (ch, )
|
September 19, 2007 |
Answer Due Deadline Updated for Yahoo!, Inc. to 10/19/2007. (ch, )
|
September 18, 2007 |
Filing 27
ORDER granting 23 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Dft AOL LLC and America Online, Inc. deadline has been extended 30 days of this order . Signed by Judge Charles Everingham on 9/18/07. (ch, )
|
September 18, 2007 |
Filing 26
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, [Unopposed] by Yahoo!, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
|
September 18, 2007 |
Answer Due Deadline Updated for AOL, LLC. to 10/19/2007; America Online, Inc. to 10/19/2007. (ch, )
|
September 17, 2007 |
Filing 23
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by AOL, LLC., America Online, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Maroulis, Victoria)
|
September 14, 2007 |
Filing 25
E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Polaris IP, LLC. A9.com, Inc. served CMRR on 8/31/2007, answer due 9/20/2007. (ch, )
|
September 14, 2007 |
Filing 24
E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Polaris IP, LLC. Borders Group, Inc. served by CMRR on 9/5/2007, answer due 9/25/2007. (ch, )
|
September 14, 2007 |
Filing 22
ORDER granting 21 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Google, Inc. deadline to answer is 10/19/07 . Signed by Judge Charles Everingham on 9/14/07. (ch, )
|
September 14, 2007 |
Answer Due Deadline Updated for Google Inc. to 10/19/2007. (ch, )
|
September 11, 2007 |
Filing 21
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Jennifer)
|
September 7, 2007 |
Filing 20
E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Polaris IP, LLC. Yahoo!, Inc. served CMRR on 8/30/2007, answer due 9/19/2007. (ch, )
|
September 7, 2007 |
Filing 19
E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Polaris IP, LLC. Amazon.com, Inc. served CMRR on 8/30/2007, answer due 9/19/2007. (ch, )
|
September 7, 2007 |
Filing 18
E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Polaris IP, LLC. IAC Search and Media, Inc. served CMRR on 8/31/2007, answer due 9/20/2007. (ch, )
|
September 7, 2007 |
Filing 17
E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Polaris IP, LLC. America Online, Inc. served CMRR on 8/30/2007, answer due 9/19/2007. (ch, )
|
September 7, 2007 |
Filing 16
E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Polaris IP, LLC. AOL, LLC. served CMRR on 8/30/2007, answer due 9/19/2007. (ch, )
|
September 7, 2007 |
Filing 15
E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Polaris IP, LLC. Google Inc. served CMRR on 8/30/2007, answer due 9/19/2007. (ch, )
|
September 7, 2007 |
Filing 14
E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Polaris IP, LLC. IAC/Interactivecorp served CMRR on 8/31/2007, answer due 9/20/2007. (ch, )
|
September 7, 2007 |
Filing 13
E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Polaris IP, LLC. Borders, Inc. served CMRR on 8/30/2007, answer due 9/19/2007. (ch, )
|
September 6, 2007 |
Filing 12
E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Amazon.com, Inc.. (ch, )
|
September 6, 2007 |
Filing 11
E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned UnExecuted by Polaris IP, LLC. as to Amazon.com, Inc. from the CT Corporation stating deft not listed on the records of the State of TX 8/30/07 (ehs, )
|
August 28, 2007 |
Filing 10
Magistrate Consent Form Mailed to Polaris IP, LLC (ch, )
|
August 28, 2007 |
Filing 9
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 8/28/07. (ch, )
|
August 28, 2007 |
Filing 8
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kajeer Yar on behalf of Polaris IP, LLC (Yar, Kajeer)
|
August 28, 2007 |
Filing 7
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jason Woodard Cook on behalf of Polaris IP, LLC (Cook, Jason)
|
August 28, 2007 |
Filing 6
E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to AOL, LLC., America Online, Inc., IAC/Interactivecorp, IAC Search and Media, Inc., Google Inc., Yahoo!, Inc., Amazon.com, Inc., A9.com, Inc., Borders, Inc., Borders Group, Inc.. (ch, )
|
August 28, 2007 |
Filing 5
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John J. Edmonds on behalf of Polaris IP, LLC (Edmonds, John)
|
August 28, 2007 |
Filing 4
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David Michael Pridham on behalf of Polaris IP, LLC (Pridham, David)
|
August 28, 2007 |
Filing 3
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Polaris IP, LLC identifying Plutus IP, LLC as Corporate Parent. (Edmonds, John)
|
August 27, 2007 |
Filing 2
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Albritton, Eric)
|
August 27, 2007 |
Filing 1
COMPLAINT against AOL, LLC., America Online, Inc., IAC/Interactivecorp, IAC Search and Media, Inc., Google Inc., Yahoo!, Inc., Amazon.com, Inc., A9.com, Inc., Borders, Inc., Borders Group, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 1242779.), filed by Polaris IP, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Albritton, Eric) Corrected Exhibit A added on 8/28/2007 (mpv, ). Modified on 8/28/2007 (mpv, ).
|