August 13, 2010 |
Filing 188
RESPONSE to 180 Sealed Patent Document, (Plaintiff's Reply in Support of Its Objections to the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation on Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity) by Paid Search Engine Tools, LLC. (DeRieux, Elizabeth)
|
August 9, 2010 |
Filing 187
RESPONSE to 179 Objection to Report and Recommendations, by Paid Search Engine Tools, LLC. (DeRieux, Elizabeth)
|
August 2, 2010 |
Filing 186
SEALED RESPONSE by Google Inc., Microsoft Corporation, Yahoo! Inc. to 180 Plaintiff Paid Search Engine Tools, LLC's Objections to the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation on Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity filed by Google Inc., Microsoft Corporation, Yahoo! Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(O'Brien, Emily)
|
July 29, 2010 |
Filing 185
ORDER granting 183 Motion for Extension of Deadlines. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 7/29/10. (mrm, )
|
July 29, 2010 |
Filing 184
ORDER OF DISMISSAL re 182 Stipulation of Dismissal and Covenant Not To Sue filed by Yahoo! Inc., Paid Search Engine Tools, LLC. The Court hereby orders that PSET's claims in the above-captioned matter shall be dismissed with prejudice with respect to claims 1-11 and 21 of U.S. Patent No. 7,043,450. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 7/29/10. (mrm, )
|
July 28, 2010 |
Filing 183
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Motion for Extension of Deadlines by Google, Inc., Microsoft Corporation, Paid Search Engine Tools, LLC, Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(O'Brien, Emily)
|
July 28, 2010 |
Filing 182
STIPULATION of Dismissal and Covenant Not to Sue by Paid Search Engine Tools, LLC, Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Race, Deborah)
|
July 22, 2010 |
Filing 181
ORDER granting 178 Motion for Extension of Time to File dispositive motions and Daubert motions. Deadline extended to July 28, 2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/22/10. (ehs, )
|
July 21, 2010 |
Filing 180
SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT(Plaintiff Paid Search Engine Tools, LLC's Objections to the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation on Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
|
July 21, 2010 |
Filing 179
OBJECTION to 172 Report and Recommendations by Google, Inc., Microsoft Corporation, Yahoo! Inc. re Google Inc.'s and Microsoft Corp.'s Motion For Summary Judgment of Invalidity by Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Perito, Andrew) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/22/2010: # 2 REVISED ORDER) (ch, ).
|
July 21, 2010 |
Filing 178
Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Dispositive and Daubert Motions by Google, Inc., Microsoft Corporation, Paid Search Engine Tools, LLC, Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kolb, Laura)
|
July 21, 2010 |
Filing 177
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Brian C Cannon for Google, Inc. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-1-5496. (ch, )
|
July 19, 2010 |
Filing 176
SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 155 SEALED MOTION to Compel 30(b)(6) Testimony (Plaintiff's Sur-Reply in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Compel 30(b)(6) Deposition Testimony) filed by Paid Search Engine Tools, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
|
July 12, 2010 |
Filing 175
RESPONSE in Opposition re 160 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Brief ISO MSJ of Invalidity for Anticipation filed by Paid Search Engine Tools, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
|
July 9, 2010 |
Filing 174
Additional Attachments to Main Document: 173 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit N, # 2 Exhibit O, # 3 Exhibit P)(O'Brien, Emily)
|
July 9, 2010 |
Filing 173
SEALED REPLY in Support of 155 SEALED MOTION to Compel 30(b)(6) Testimony filed by Google, Inc., Microsoft Corporation, Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit L, # 2 Exhibit M)(O'Brien, Emily)
|
July 7, 2010 |
Filing 172
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 92 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity for Anticipation of Claims 12, 13, 15, 18 and 22 of U.S. Patent 7,043,450 under 35 U.S.C. § 102(e) MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity for Anticipation of Claims 12, 13, 15, 18 and 22 of U.S. Patent 7,043,450 under 35 U.S.C. § 102(e) filed by Google, Inc., Microsoft Corporation. Recommending Granting in part and Denying in part. A party has 14 days to from date of receipt to file written objections. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/7/2010. (ch, )
|
July 6, 2010 |
Filing 171
ORDER granting 169 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Deadline for Dfts to serve their Final Invalidity Contentions is 7/7/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/6/2010. (ch, )
|
July 2, 2010 |
Filing 170
RESPONSE to 150 Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court (Surreply Brief in Opposition to Defendants' Reply in Support of Statement of Objections to The May 10 Claim Construction Memorandum Opinion and Order) by Paid Search Engine Tools, LLC. (DeRieux, Elizabeth)
|
July 2, 2010 |
Filing 169
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Motion for Extension of Time to Serve Final Invalidity Contentions by Google, Inc., Microsoft Corporation, Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Race, Deborah)
|
July 2, 2010 |
Filing 168
***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE.***BRIEF filed Surreply Brief in Opposition to Defendants' Reply in Support of Statement of Objections to The May 10 Claim Construction Memorandum Opinion and Order by Paid Search Engine Tools, LLC. (DeRieux, Elizabeth) Modified on 7/2/2010 (ch, ).
|
July 2, 2010 |
***FILED IN ERROR. FILE UNDER WRONG EVENT Document # 168, Sur-Reply in Opposition. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
|
July 1, 2010 |
Filing 167
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrew Louis Perito on behalf of Yahoo! Inc. (Perito, Andrew)
|
June 30, 2010 |
Filing 166
ORDER granting 165 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Deadline extended to 7/2/10. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/30/10. (ehs, )
|
June 29, 2010 |
Filing 165
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Serve Final Invalidity Contentions by Google, Inc., Microsoft Corporation, Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Race, Deborah)
|
June 28, 2010 |
Filing 164
SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 162 Sealed Response to Motion,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit C - Part 1, # 2 Exhibit C - Part 2.1, # 3 Exhibit C - Part 2.2, # 4 Exhbit C - Part 3.1, # 5 Exhibit C - Part 3.2, # 6 Exhibit C - Part 4, # 7 Exhibit D)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
|
June 28, 2010 |
Filing 163
SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 162 Sealed Response to Motion,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B - Part 3, # 2 Exhibit B - Part 4, # 3 Exhibit B - Part 5, # 4 Exhibit B - Part 6)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
|
June 28, 2010 |
Filing 162
SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 155 SEALED MOTION to Compel 30(b)(6) Testimony filed by Paid Search Engine Tools, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B - Part 1, # 4 Exhibit B - Part 2)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
|
June 24, 2010 |
Filing 161
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Amy H Candido on behalf of Google, Inc. (Candido, Amy)
|
June 22, 2010 |
Filing 160
Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Brief ISO MSJ of Invalidity for Anticipation by Google, Inc., Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Supplemental Brief ISO MSJ of Invalidity for Anticipation)(Sistos, Antonio)
|
June 21, 2010 |
Filing 159
BRIEF filed Reply in Support of Defendants' Objections to the May 10 Claim Construction Memorandum Opinion and Order by Google, Inc., Microsoft Corporation, Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Perlson, David)
|
June 18, 2010 |
Filing 158
APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court by Paid Search Engine Tools, LLC re 148 Memorandum & Opinion, (DeRieux, Elizabeth)
|
June 11, 2010 |
Filing 157
RESPONSE to 150 Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court by Paid Search Engine Tools, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
|
June 10, 2010 |
Filing 156
Additional Attachments to Main Document: 155 SEALED MOTION to Compel 30(b)(6) Testimony.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H)(O'Brien, Emily)
|
June 10, 2010 |
Filing 155
SEALED MOTION to Compel 30(b)(6) Testimony by Google, Inc., Microsoft Corporation, Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit I, # 2 Exhibit J)(O'Brien, Emily)
|
June 7, 2010 |
Filing 154
RESPONSE to 153 Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court by Google, Inc., Microsoft Corporation, Yahoo! Inc.. (Perlson, David)
|
May 26, 2010 |
Filing 153
APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court by Paid Search Engine Tools, LLC re 148 Memorandum & Opinion, (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
|
May 26, 2010 |
Filing 152
ORDER granting in part, denying in part 127 Motion to Compel. PSETs motion is granted as to Eric Veach, Salar Kamangar, and Susan Wojcicki. Each deposition is limited to four hours. As to Eric Schmidt, however, PSETs motion is denied without prejudice. The court is not persuaded at this time that PSET could not obtain the requested information from alternative sources. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 5/26/10. (ehs, )
|
May 26, 2010 |
NOTICE of DEFICIENCY regarding the #151 Motion for reconsideration submitted by Paid Search Engine Tools, LLC. No certificate of conference. Correction should be made by 1 business day. Motion is now terminated. (sm, )
|
May 25, 2010 |
Filing 151
***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT, PLEASE IGNORE.*** MOTION for Reconsideration re 148 Memorandum & Opinion, (Plaintiff's Objections to and Motion for Reconsideration of Magistrate Judge Everingham's May 10, 2010 Claim Construction Memorandum Order and Opinion) by Paid Search Engine Tools, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth) Modified on 5/26/2010 (sm, ).
|
May 24, 2010 |
Filing 150
APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court by Google, Inc., Microsoft Corporation, Yahoo! Inc. re 148 Memorandum & Opinion, (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sistos, Antonio)
|
May 19, 2010 |
Filing 149
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of HOTLINE CONFERENCE held on 10/28/09 before Judge Chad Everingham. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR,Telephone number: (903) 663-5082. (13 Pages)NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/14/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/24/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/20/2010. (tja, )
|
May 10, 2010 |
Filing 148
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER - After considering the submissions and the arguments of counsel, the court issues the following order concerning the claim construction issues herein (see order for details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 5/10/2010. (ch, )
|
May 5, 2010 |
Filing 147
SEALED SUR-REPLY to Motion re 127 MOTION to Compel Deposition Testimony filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6)(O'Brien, Emily)
|
April 30, 2010 |
Filing 146
ORDER granting 145 Motion to Withdraw Plaintiffs Second Motion to Compel the Production of Documents from Defendant Google, Inc. (Dkt. Nos. 124, 125 and 140) as well as all claims for relief sought in Googles Response (Dkt. No. 133). Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 4/30/10. (ehs, )
|
April 29, 2010 |
Filing 145
Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw 124 Second MOTION to Compel The Production of Documents From Defendant Google Inc. by Paid Search Engine Tools, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
|
April 28, 2010 |
Filing 144
ORDER granting 143 Motion for Extension of Time to File Sur-Reply. Deadline for filing a Sur-Reply to Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Deposition Testimony is 5/5/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 4/28/2010. (ch, )
|
April 27, 2010 |
Filing 143
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Sur-Reply by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(O'Brien, Emily)
|
April 20, 2010 |
Filing 142
REPLY to Response to Motion re 127 MOTION to Compel Deposition Testimony filed by Paid Search Engine Tools, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit H - Part 1, # 2 Exhibit H - Part 2, # 3 Exhibit H - Part 3, # 4 Exhibit H - Part 4, # 5 Exhibit I, # 6 Exhibit J, # 7 Exhibit K, # 8 Exhibit L, # 9 Exhibit M)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
|
April 19, 2010 |
Filing 141
SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 140 Reply to Response to Motion. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits L - N)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
|
April 19, 2010 |
Filing 140
***WITHDRAWN PER ORDER # 146 ***REPLY to Response to Motion re 124 Second MOTION to Compel The Production of Documents From Defendant Google Inc. filed by Paid Search Engine Tools, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits O - Q)(DeRieux, Elizabeth) Modified on 4/30/2010 (ehs, ).
|
April 14, 2010 |
Filing 139
NOTICE by Paid Search Engine Tools, LLC re 135 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) (Response to Defendants' Notice of Supplemental Authority) (Rambin, Daymon)
|
April 13, 2010 |
Filing 138
ORDER granting 137 Motion for Extension of Time to File its Reply in Support of its Second Motion to Compel the Production of Documents from Defendant Google, Inc.. Deadline extended to 4/19/10. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 4/13/10. (ehs, )
|
April 12, 2010 |
Filing 137
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File by Paid Search Engine Tools, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rambin, Daymon)
|
April 9, 2010 |
Filing 136
SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 127 MOTION to Compel Deposition Testimony filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Declaration of Emily C. O'Brien, # 12 Declaration of Eric Schmidt, # 13 Declaration of Susan Wojcicki, # 14 Declaration of Salar Kamangar, # 15 Text of Proposed Order)(O'Brien, Emily)
|
April 9, 2010 |
Filing 135
NOTICE by Google, Inc., Microsoft Corporation re 92 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity for Anticipation of Claims 12, 13, 15, 18 and 22 of U.S. Patent 7,043,450 under 35 U.S.C. § 102(e) MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity for Anticipation of Claims 12, 13, 15, 18 and 22 of U.S. Patent 7,043,450 under 35 U.S.C. § 102(e) Notice of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(O'Brien, Emily)
|
April 9, 2010 |
Filing 134
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT HEARING held on 2/10/10 before Judge Chad Everingham. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR,Telephone number: (903) 663-5082. (29 pages)NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/3/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/13/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/12/2010. (tja, )
|
April 1, 2010 |
Filing 133
***WITHDRAWN PER ORDER # 146 ***SEALED Opposition to Second MOTION to Compel The Production of Documents From Defendant Google Inc. filed by Google, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Declaration of Emily C. O'Brien in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiff's Second Motion to Compel Documents, # 10 Text of Proposed Order)(O'Brien, Emily) Modified on 4/30/2010 (ehs, ).
|
March 26, 2010 |
Filing 132
ORDER granting 130 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The new deadline for filing an Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Deposition Testimony is April 9, 2010.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 3/26/10. (ehs, )
|
March 25, 2010 |
Filing 131
ORDER granting 129 Motion for Extension of Time to File opposition to Pltf's second motion to compel production of documents from deft Google Inc. Deadline extended to 4/1/10. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 3/25/10. (ehs, )
|
March 25, 2010 |
Filing 130
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(O'Brien, Emily)
|
March 24, 2010 |
Filing 129
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(O'Brien, Emily)
|
March 18, 2010 |
Filing 128
SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 127 MOTION to Compel Deposition Testimony. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit C, # 2 Exhibit F, # 3 Exhibit G, # 4 Exhibit H - Part 1 of 3, # 5 Exhibit H - Part 2 of 3, # 6 Exhibit H - Part 3 of 3)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
|
March 18, 2010 |
Filing 127
MOTION to Compel Deposition Testimony by Paid Search Engine Tools, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
|
March 11, 2010 |
Filing 126
SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 114 MOTION to Compel The Production of Documents From Defendant Google, Inc. filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Emily C. O'Brien in Support of Google's Sur-Reply)(O'Brien, Emily)
|
March 8, 2010 |
Filing 125
***WITHDRAWN PER ORDER 146 ***SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 124 Second MOTION to Compel The Production of Documents From Defendant Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit I)(DeRieux, Elizabeth) Modified on 4/30/2010 (ehs, ).
|
March 8, 2010 |
Filing 124
***WITHDRAWN PER ORDER # 146 ***Second MOTION to Compel The Production of Documents From Defendant Google Inc. by Paid Search Engine Tools, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth) Modified on 4/30/2010 (ehs, ).
|
March 8, 2010 |
Filing 123
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of MARKMAN HEARING held on 2/10/10 before Judge Chad Everingham. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR,Telephone number: (903) 663-5082. (121 Pages) NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/1/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/12/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/9/2010. (tja, )
|
March 1, 2010 |
Filing 122
REPLY to Response to Motion re 114 MOTION to Compel The Production of Documents From Defendant Google, Inc. filed by Paid Search Engine Tools, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Linden, Paul)
|
February 18, 2010 |
Filing 121
RESPONSE in Opposition re 114 MOTION to Compel The Production of Documents From Defendant Google, Inc. filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Affidavit Declaration of Emily C. O'Brien in Support of Google's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel, # 12 Text of Proposed Order)(O'Brien, Emily)
|
February 10, 2010 |
Filing 120
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham: Markman Hearing and Motion Hearing held on 2/10/2010. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR.) (Attachments: # 1 Sign-in sheet) (jml)
|
February 8, 2010 |
Filing 119
ORDER granting 118 Motion for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Production of Documents from Defendant Google Inc.. Deadline extended to February 18, 2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 2/8/10. (ehs, )
|
February 3, 2010 |
Filing 118
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Google Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time for Filing Opposition by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(O'Brien, Emily)
|
January 28, 2010 |
Filing 117
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Deborah J Race on behalf of Yahoo! Inc. (Race, Deborah)
|
January 28, 2010 |
Filing 116
SEALED DEFENDANTS' SUR-REPLY CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF, filed by Google, Inc., Microsoft Corporation, Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit D, # 2 Exhibit E)(O'Brien, Emily)
|
January 27, 2010 |
Filing 115
SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 114 MOTION to Compel The Production of Documents From Defendant Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit F)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
|
January 27, 2010 |
Filing 114
MOTION to Compel The Production of Documents From Defendant Google, Inc. by Paid Search Engine Tools, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
|
January 21, 2010 |
Filing 113
ORDER granting 110 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages for Plaintiff s Reply Claim Construction Brief to twentyfive pages and allow Defendants to file a 10 page Sur-Reply Claim Construction Brief. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 1/21/10. (ehs, )
|
January 18, 2010 |
Filing 112
REPLY CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Paid Search Engine Tools, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
|
January 18, 2010 |
Filing 111
SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 92 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity for Anticipation of Claims 12, 13, 15, 18 and 22 of U.S. Patent 7,043,450 under 35 U.S.C. § 102(e) MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity for Anticipation of Claims 12, 13, 15, 18 and 22 of U.S. Patent 7,043,450 under 35 U.S.C. § 102(e) filed by Paid Search Engine Tools, LLC. (DeRieux, Elizabeth)
|
January 15, 2010 |
Filing 110
Joint MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages (Joint Motion to Extend Page Limits and for Leave to File a Sur-Reply Claim Construction Brief) by Google, Inc., Microsoft Corporation, Paid Search Engine Tools, LLC, Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
|
January 14, 2010 |
Filing 109
NOTICE of Hearing: Hearing set immediately following the Markman on Defendant Google Inc. and Microsoft Corporation's Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity for Anticipation of Claims 12, 13, 15, 18, and 22 of U.S. Patent 7,043,450 Under 35 U.S.C. § 102(e) (Dkt. #92), for 2/10/2010, 09:00 AM, in Mag Ctrm (Marshall) before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham.(delat)
|
January 14, 2010 |
Filing 108
NOTICE by Google, Inc., Microsoft Corporation Notice of Office Action in Inter Partes Reexamination of U.S. Patent No. 7,043,450 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(O'Brien, Emily)
|
January 13, 2010 |
Filing 107
ORDER granting 106 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Plaintiff to file its Sur-Reply to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment and for Plaintiff to file its Reply Claim Construction Brief to January 18, 2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 1/13/10. (ehs, )
|
January 12, 2010 |
Filing 106
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Sur-Reply to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment and Reply Claim Construction Brief by Paid Search Engine Tools, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rambin, Daymon)
|
January 6, 2010 |
Filing 105
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert William Schroeder, III on behalf of Google, Inc. (Schroeder, Robert)
|
December 23, 2009 |
Filing 104
REPLY to Response to Motion re 92 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity for Anticipation of Claims 12, 13, 15, 18 and 22 of U.S. Patent 7,043,450 under 35 U.S.C. § 102(e) MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity for Anticipation of Claims 12, 13, 15, 18 and 22 of U.S. Patent 7,043,450 under 35 U.S.C. § 102(e) filed by Google, Inc., Microsoft Corporation. (Kolb, Laura)
|
December 15, 2009 |
Filing 103
ORDER granting 102 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply to Plaintiffs Opposition to Google and Microsofts Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity. Responses due by 12/23/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 12/15/09. (ehs, )
|
December 14, 2009 |
Filing 102
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 92 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity for Anticipation of Claims 12, 13, 15, 18 and 22 of U.S. Patent 7,043,450 under 35 U.S.C. § 102(e) MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity for Anticipation of Claims 12, 13, 15, 18 and 22 of U.S. Patent 7,043,450 under 35 U.S.C. § 102(e) by Google, Inc., Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(O'Brien, Emily)
|
December 11, 2009 |
Filing 101
Defendants' Responsive Claim Construction Brief, filed by Google, Inc., Microsoft Corporation, Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(O'Brien, Emily)
|
December 4, 2009 |
Filing 100
RESPONSE in Opposition re 92 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity for Anticipation of Claims 12, 13, 15, 18 and 22 of U.S. Patent 7,043,450 under 35 U.S.C. § 102(e) MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity for Anticipation of Claims 12, 13, 15, 18 and 22 of U.S. Patent 7,043,450 under 35 U.S.C. § 102(e) filed by Paid Search Engine Tools, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
|
December 1, 2009 |
Filing 99
ORDER granting 98 Motion for Extension of Time to file certain deadlines. Deadline for Pla to respond to Dft's Motion for Summary Judgment is 12/4/09. Deadline for Dft's to file their Responsive Claim Construction Brief is 12/11/09, and Deadline for Pla to files its Reply Claim Construction Brief is 1/11/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 12/1/09. (ch, )
|
November 30, 2009 |
Filing 98
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File (Unopposed Motion to Extend Various Deadlines) by Paid Search Engine Tools, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
|
November 16, 2009 |
Filing 97
ORDER granting 96 Motion to Extend Various Deadlines. Deadline for Plaintiff to respond to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment is extended to November 30,2009. Deadline for Defendants to file their Responsive Claim Construction Brief is extended to December 4,2009. Deadline for Plaintiff to file its Reply Claim Construction Brief is extended to January 4,2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 11/16/09. (ehs, )
|
November 13, 2009 |
Filing 96
Unopposed MOTION To Extend Various Deadlines by Paid Search Engine Tools, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
|
October 30, 2009 |
Filing 95
ORDER granting 94 Motion to Extend Various Deadlines. Deadline for Plaintiff to respond to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment is extended to November 16, 2009. Deadline for Defendants to file their Responsive Claim Construction Brief is extended to November 20, 2009. Page Limit for Defendants' Responsive Claim Construction Brief is extended to forty (40) pages, Deadline for Plaintiff to file its Reply Claim Construction Brief is extended to December 14, 2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 10/30/09. (ehs, )
|
October 29, 2009 |
Filing 94
Unopposed MOTION To Extend Various Deadlines by Paid Search Engine Tools, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
|
October 28, 2009 |
Filing 93
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham: Hotline Conference held on 10/28/2009. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR.) (jml)
|
October 13, 2009 |
Filing 92
MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity for Anticipation of Claims 12, 13, 15, 18 and 22 of U.S. Patent 7,043,450 under 35 U.S.C. § 102(e) by Google, Inc., Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Emily C. O'Brien, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Text of Proposed Order)(O'Brien, Emily)
|
October 12, 2009 |
Filing 91
PLAINTIFF'S OPENING CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Paid Search Engine Tools, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Part 1, # 3 Exhibit 2 - Part 2, # 4 Exhibit 2 - Part 3, # 5 Exhbiit 2 - Part 4, # 6 Exhibit 2 - Part 5, # 7 Exhibit 2 - Part 6, # 8 Exhibit 3, # 9 Exhibit 4 - Part 1, # 10 Exhibit 4 - Part 2, # 11 Exhibit 4 - Part 3, # 12 Exhibit 4 - Part 4, # 13 Exhibit 4 - Part 5, # 14 Exhibit 5, # 15 Exhibit 6, # 16 Exhibit 7, # 17 Exhibit 8 - Part1, # 18 Exhibit 8 - Part 2, # 19 Exhibit 8 - Part 3, # 20 Exhibit 8 - Part 4)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
|
October 9, 2009 |
Filing 90
ORDER granting 88 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages for Plaintiff s Opening Claim Construction Brief to forty pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 10/9/09. (ehs, )
|
October 9, 2009 |
Filing 89
ORDER granting Pltf's 87 Motion for Extension of Time to File its Opening Claim Construction Brief.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 10/9/09. (ehs, )
|
October 8, 2009 |
Filing 88
Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Paid Search Engine Tools, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
|
October 8, 2009 |
Filing 87
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiff's Opening Claim Construction Brief by Paid Search Engine Tools, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
|
October 8, 2009 |
Filing 86
ORDER granting 85 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jack Wesley Hill terminated as counsel for Yahoo! Inc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 10/8/09. (ch, )
|
October 7, 2009 |
Filing 85
Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack)
|
October 1, 2009 |
Filing 84
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Danielle Rosenthal for Yahoo! Inc. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-1-4944. (ch, )
|
October 1, 2009 |
Filing 83
ORDER granting 82 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Deadline extended to 10/9/09. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 10/1/09. (ehs, )
|
September 30, 2009 |
Filing 82
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opening Claim Construction Brief by Paid Search Engine Tools, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
|
September 22, 2009 |
Filing 81
ORDER granting 80 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Deadline extended until October 30, 2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 9/22/09. (ehs, )
|
September 18, 2009 |
Filing 80
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (Claim Construction) by Google, Inc., Microsoft Corporation, Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack)
|
September 15, 2009 |
Filing 79
ORDER granting 77 Motion for Extension of Time to File Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement. Deadline is 9/14/09. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 9/15/09. (ch, )
|
September 14, 2009 |
Filing 78
JOINT CLAIM CONSTRUCTION AND PREHEARING STATEMENT filed by Google, Inc., Microsoft Corporation, Paid Search Engine Tools, LLC, Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
|
September 11, 2009 |
Filing 77
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File the Parties' Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement by Paid Search Engine Tools, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
|
September 8, 2009 |
Filing 76
ORDER granting 75 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Deadline extended to 9/11/09. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 9/8/09. (ehs, )
|
September 4, 2009 |
Filing 75
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery To Extend Deadline For Filing the Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement Under Patent Rule 4-3 by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sistos, Antonio)
|
August 26, 2009 |
Filing 74
ORDER granting 73 Motion for appointment of Mediator. Court appoints Robert W Faulkner as mediator. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 8/26/09. (ehs, )
|
August 21, 2009 |
Filing 73
Agreed MOTION For Appointment of Mediator by Paid Search Engine Tools, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
|
July 29, 2009 |
Filing 72
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Paul J Linden for Paid Search Engine Tools, LLC. (APPROVED FEE PAID 2-1-4840) (ehs, )
|
July 29, 2009 |
Filing 71
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Adam G Pugh for Paid Search Engine Tools, LLC. (APPROVED FEE PAID 2-1-4840) (ehs, )
|
July 15, 2009 |
Filing 70
ORDER granting 69 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Nancy Claire Abernathy terminated as counsel for Paid Search Engine Tools, LLC.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/15/09. (ehs, )
|
July 13, 2009 |
Filing 69
Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney N. Claire Abernathy by Paid Search Engine Tools, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
|
July 1, 2009 |
Filing 68
ORDER granting 67 Motion for Extension of Time to Comply with P.R. 4-1 (b). Deadline is extended to 7/7/09. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/1/09. (ch, )
|
June 30, 2009 |
Filing 67
Joint MOTION to Extend the P.R. 4-1(b) Deadline by Paid Search Engine Tools, LLC, Google, Inc., Microsoft Corporation, Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Abernathy, Nancy)
|
June 26, 2009 |
Filing 66
NOTICE by Paid Search Engine Tools, LLC Notice of Asserted Claims (Chambers, J)
|
June 15, 2009 |
Filing 65
ORDER granting 64 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Deadline for Plaintiff and Defendants to Exchange Proposed Terms and Claim Elements for Construction under P.R. 4-1 shall be extended until and through June 17, 2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/15/09. (ehs, )
|
June 12, 2009 |
Filing 64
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery To Extend Deadline For Exchange Of Proposed Terms And Claim Elements For Construction Under Patent Rule 4-1 by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sistos, Antonio)
|
June 12, 2009 |
Filing 63
NOTICE of Disclosure by Paid Search Engine Tools, LLC (Abernathy, Nancy)
|
June 4, 2009 |
Filing 62
ORDER - Before the Court are Plaintiffs Motions to Consolidate (2:07-CV-403 Dkt. No. 50 and 2:08-CV-61 Dkt. No. 74) and Defendants responses (2:07-CV-403 Dkt. No. 53 and 2:08-CV-61 Dkt. No. 75). Having considered the parties positions, Plaintiffs motions to consolidate are hereby GRANTED. The consolidated action shall be governed by the current scheduling order in case number 2:08-CV-61. Dkt No. 51. In addition, the consolidated action is hereby REFERRED to the Honorable Charles Everingham for case management. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 6/4/09. (ch, )
|
May 27, 2009 |
Filing 61
NOTICE by Paid Search Engine Tools, LLC, Yahoo! Inc. (Joint Notice Regarding Privilege Disputes) (DeRieux, Elizabeth)
|
May 6, 2009 |
Filing 60
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daymon Jeffrey Rambin on behalf of Paid Search Engine Tools, LLC (Rambin, Daymon)
|
May 6, 2009 |
Filing 59
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Peter Sandel for Yahoo! Inc.. (APPROVED, FEE PAID, 6-1-17821) (ehs, )
|
April 29, 2009 |
Filing 58
ORDER granting 57 Motion TO EXTEND TIME TO NOTIFY COURT OF PRIVILEGE DISPUTES; the Court GRANTS the motion and extends the deadline in paragraph 5 of the Discovery Order from April 27, 2009 until May 27,2009.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 4/29/09. (mrm, )
|
April 27, 2009 |
Filing 57
Joint MOTION To Extend Time to Notify the Court of Privilege Disputes by Paid Search Engine Tools, LLC, Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
|
April 14, 2009 |
Filing 56
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge David Folsom for all further proceedings. Judge T. John Ward no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 4/14/09. (ehs, )
|
April 7, 2009 |
Filing 55
ORDER granting 54 Motion to notify the Court of privilege disputes. Deadline extended to 4/27/09. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 4/7/09. (ehs, )
|
April 3, 2009 |
Filing 54
Joint MOTION To Extend Time To Notify Court Of Privilege Disputes by Paid Search Engine Tools, LLC, Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
|
March 26, 2009 |
Filing 53
RESPONSE to Motion re 50 Opposed MOTION to Consolidate Cases (Plaintiff Paid Search Engine Tools, LLC's Motion to Consolidate)Opposed MOTION to Consolidate Cases (Plaintiff Paid Search Engine Tools, LLC's Motion to Consolidate) filed by Yahoo! Inc.. (Hill, Jack)
|
March 23, 2009 |
Filing 52
ORDER granting 51 Motion to Extend Time to Notify Court of Privilege disputes. Deadline extended to 4/6/09. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 3/23/09. (ehs, )
|
March 20, 2009 |
Filing 51
Joint MOTION to Extend Time to Notify Court of Privilege Disputes by Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack)
|
March 11, 2009 |
Filing 50
Opposed MOTION to Consolidate Cases (Plaintiff Paid Search Engine Tools, LLC's Motion to Consolidate) by Paid Search Engine Tools, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/11/2009: # 3 Text of Proposed Order) (ch, ).
|
February 23, 2009 |
Filing 49
ORDER granting 48 Motion to extend time to notify the court of privilege disputes. Deadline extended to 3/23/09. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 2/23/09. (ehs, )
|
February 19, 2009 |
Filing 48
Consent MOTION to Extend Time to Notify Court of Privilege Disputes by Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack)
|
December 19, 2008 |
Filing 47
ORDER granting 46 Motion to Extend time to Notify Court of Privilege Disputes. Extends the deadline in paragraph 5 of Discovery Order to 2/19/09. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 12/19/08. (ch, )
|
December 18, 2008 |
Filing 46
Consent MOTION to Extend Time to Notify Court of Privilege Disputes by Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack)
|
November 3, 2008 |
Filing 45
AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 11/3/08. (ehs, )
|
November 2, 2008 |
Filing 44
Agreed MOTION for Protective Order (Agreed Motion for Entry of Protective Order) by Paid Search Engine Tools, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Agreed Protective Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
|
October 14, 2008 |
Filing 43
NOTICE of Disclosure by Yahoo! Inc. (Lumish, Douglas)
|
October 14, 2008 |
Filing 42
NOTICE by Paid Search Engine Tools, LLC (Plaintiff Paid Search Engine Tools, LLC's Notice of Additional Disclosures Pursuant to Paragraph 3(c) of the Court's Discovery Order) (Abernathy, Nancy)
|
October 2, 2008 |
Filing 41
ORDER granting 40 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Melissa Richards Smith terminated as counsel for Paid Search Engine Tools LLC. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 10/2/08. (ch, )
|
October 1, 2008 |
Filing 40
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Paid Search Engine Tools, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
|
September 30, 2008 |
Filing 39
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Otis W Carroll, Jr on behalf of Yahoo! Inc. (Carroll, Otis)
|
September 29, 2008 |
Filing 38
NOTICE by Paid Search Engine Tools, LLC (Plaintiff Paid Search Engine Tools, LLC's Notice of Additional Disclosures) (DeRieux, Elizabeth)
|
September 19, 2008 |
Filing 37
ORDER granting 35 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney David J Healey terminated as attorney of record for Dft Yahoo!, Inc.. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 9/19/08. (ch, )
|
September 18, 2008 |
Filing 36
NOTICE of Designation of Attorney in Charge to Douglas E Lumish on behalf of Yahoo! Inc. (Lumish, Douglas)
|
September 18, 2008 |
Filing 35
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of David Healey by Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Healey, David)
|
July 31, 2008 |
Filing 34
NOTICE by Yahoo! Inc. of Invalidity Contentions (Powers, Matthew)
|
June 30, 2008 |
Filing 33
NOTICE of Disclosure by Paid Search Engine Tools, LLC (Plaintiff Paid Search Engine Tools, LLC's Notice of Initial Disclosures) (DeRieux, Elizabeth)
|
June 27, 2008 |
Filing 32
NOTICE of Disclosure by Yahoo! Inc. (Initial) (Powers, Matthew)
|
June 10, 2008 |
Filing 31
NOTICE by Paid Search Engine Tools, LLC (Plaintiff Paid Search Engine Tools, LLC's Notice of Disclosure of Asserted Claims and Infringement Contentions under P.R. 3-1 and 3-2) (DeRieux, Elizabeth)
|
May 29, 2008 |
Filing 30
DOCKET CONTROL ORDER ( Amended Pleadings due by 6/12/2009. Discovery due by 7/22/2010. Joinder of Parties due by 6/12/2009. Markman Hearing set for 5/26/2010 09:00 AM before Judge T. John Ward. Motions due by 8/13/2010. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 8/6/2010. Jury Selection set for 9/7/2010 09:00AM before Judge T. John Ward. Pretrial Conference set for 8/31/2010 01:30 PM before Judge T. John Ward.) Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 5/29/08. (ehs, )
|
May 29, 2008 |
Filing 29
DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 5/29/08. (ch, )
|
May 20, 2008 |
Filing 28
Joint MOTION for Entry of Docket Control Order and Discovery Order by Paid Search Engine Tools, LLC, Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Docket Control Order, # 2 Exhibit B - Proposed Discovery Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
|
May 20, 2008 |
Filing 27
ORDER granting 26 Motion for Extension of Time to File proposed discovery and docket control orders. Deadline extended to 5/20/08. Signed by Judge Judge T. John Ward on 5/20/08. (ehs, )
|
May 15, 2008 |
Filing 26
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File (Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Proposed Docket Control and Discovery Orders) by Paid Search Engine Tools, LLC, Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
|
May 2, 2008 |
Filing 25
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert Christopher Bunt on behalf of Paid Search Engine Tools, LLC (Bunt, Robert)
|
May 2, 2008 |
Filing 24
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Charles Ainsworth on behalf of Paid Search Engine Tools, LLC (Ainsworth, Charles)
|
May 1, 2008 |
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge T. John Ward and Judge Charles Everingham: Status Conference held on 5/1/08. Counsel for the parties appeared and were asked if they consented to Judge Everingham. Depending on their answer, they were then given Markman and jury selection dates for the appropriate court. The parties are to meet and confer regarding a scheduling order and discovery order, and the parties have 14 days to submit the proposed orders. Court adjourned. (Court Reporter Susan Simmons.)(delat)
|
May 1, 2008 |
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge T. John Ward and Judge Charles Everingham: Status Conference held on 5/01/08. Counsel for the parties appeared and were asked if they consented to Judge Everingham. Depending on their answer, they were then given Markman and jury selection dates for the appropriate court. The parties are to meet and confer regarding a scheduling order and discovery order, and the parties have 14 days to submit the proposed orders. Court adjourned. (Court Reporter Susan Simmons.) (shd, )
|
April 28, 2008 |
Filing 23
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Yen P Nguyen for Yahoo! Inc.. (FEE PAID) 2-1-3745(ehs, )
|
April 24, 2008 |
Filing 22
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nancy Claire Abernathy on behalf of Paid Search Engine Tools, LLC (Abernathy, Nancy)
|
April 24, 2008 |
Filing 21
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Elizabeth L DeRieux on behalf of Paid Search Engine Tools, LLC (DeRieux, Elizabeth)
|
April 24, 2008 |
Filing 20
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sidney Calvin Capshaw, III on behalf of Paid Search Engine Tools, LLC (Capshaw, Sidney)
|
April 17, 2008 |
Filing 19
NOTICE by Paid Search Engine Tools, LLC Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (Smith, Melissa)
|
April 11, 2008 |
Filing 18
ORDER - this case is set for Status Conference of 5/1/08. The court will give the parties an opportunity to reach agreements on the Docket Control Order and Discovery Order. Accordingly the court orders that disclosures under P R 3-1 and P R. 3-2 are due on 5/16/08. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 4/11/08. (ch, )
|
April 3, 2008 |
Filing 17
ORDER - Status Conference set for 5/1/2008 11:00 AM before Judge T. John Ward, and Judge Chad Everingham. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 4/3/08. (ch, )
|
March 21, 2008 |
Filing 16
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Rebecca E Fett for Yahoo! Inc. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 1-1-5685. (ch, )
|
December 3, 2007 |
Filing 15
ANSWER to Counterclaim by Paid Search Engine Tools, LLC.(Chambers, J)
|
November 8, 2007 |
Filing 14
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Yahoo! Inc. identifying Capital Research and Management Company as Corporate Parent. (Healey, David)
|
November 8, 2007 |
Filing 13
ANSWER to Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Paid Search Engine Tools, LLC by Yahoo! Inc..(Healey, David)
|
October 29, 2007 |
Filing 12
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Daniel J Melman for Yahoo! Inc. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 2-1-3166. (ch, )
|
October 25, 2007 |
Filing 11
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Matthew Douglas Powers for Yahoo! Inc. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 2-1-3151. (ch, )
|
October 24, 2007 |
Filing 10
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Douglas E Lumish for Yahoo! Inc. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 2-1-3150. (ch, )
|
October 17, 2007 |
Filing 9
ORDER - granting 8 Stipulation extending time to answer. Yahoo! deadline is extended to 11/8/07. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 10/17/07. (ch, )
|
October 17, 2007 |
Answer Due Deadline Updated for Yahoo! Inc. to 11/8/2007. (ch, )
|
October 15, 2007 |
Filing 8
STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANT YAHOO!, INC. TO RESPOND by Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Healey, David)
|
October 11, 2007 |
***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 7, Stipulation and order. Atty will refile PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
|
October 9, 2007 |
Filing 7
***FILED IN ERROR ATTY WILL REFILE***STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANT YAHOO!, INC. TO RESPOND by Yahoo! Inc.. (Healey, David) Modified on 10/11/2007 (ch, ).
|
October 1, 2007 |
Filing 6
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Gregory M Utter for Paid Search Engine Tools, LLC.(FEE PAID) 2-1-3055 (ehs, )
|
October 1, 2007 |
Filing 5
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Warren Jeffrey Sefton for Paid Search Engine Tools, LLC. (FEE PAID) 2-1-3055 (ehs, )
|
September 25, 2007 |
Filing 4
E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Paid Search Engine Tools, LLC. Yahoo! Inc. served on 9/18/2007, answer due 10/9/2007. (ehs, )
|
September 17, 2007 |
Filing 3
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Paid Search Engine Tools, LLC identifying None as Corporate Parent. (Smith, Melissa)
|
September 13, 2007 |
Filing fee: $ 350.00, receipt number 2-1-2988 (ch, )
|
September 13, 2007 |
Filing 2
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney J Robert Chambers for Paid Search Engine Tools, LLC. APPROVED (FEE PAID) 2-1-2989 (poa, )
|
September 13, 2007 |
Filing 1
COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Yahoo! Inc. (Filing fee $ 350.) , filed by Paid Search Engine Tools, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ehs, )
|
September 13, 2007 |
E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Yahoo! Inc. (ehs, )
|