Performance Pricing, Inc. v. Google Inc. et al Featured Case

Plaintiff Performance Pricing, Inc. sued Google Inc., AOL LLC, Microsoft Corporation and Yahoo! Inc. for infringing U.S. Patent No. 6,978,253 entitled "Systems and Methods for Transacting Business Over a Global Communications Network such as the Internet."

Plaintiff: Performance Pricing, Inc.
Defendant: Google Inc., AOL LLC, Microsoft Corporation, Yahoo! Inc., A9.com, Inc. and IAC Search & Media, Inc.
Counter Claimant: Yahoo! Inc., Microsoft Corporation, A9.com, Inc., AOL LLC, Google Inc. and IAC Search & Media, Inc.
Counter Defendant: Performance Pricing, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2007cv00432
Filed: September 27, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Marshall Office
County: Anderson
Presiding Judge: Leonard Davis
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 29, 2010 ***MODIFIED Document # 355 to attach correct document/Order (ehs, )
June 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 355 ORDER denying attorneys' fees and partially granting costs re: 342 Sealed Motion; 343 Sealed Motion. Ruling set forth herein. Signed by Judge Randall R. Rader on 6/29/10. (ehs, )
June 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 354 AGREED ORDER MAKING PUBLIC PORTIONS OF CERTAIN BRIEFS, DECLARATIONS, AND EXHIBITS FILED UNDER SEAL - this order supersedes Dkt No. 353. Signed by Judge Randall R. Rader on 6/15/2010. (ch, )
June 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 353 AGREED ORDER MAKING PUBLIC PORTIONS OF CERTAIN BRIEFS, DECLARATIONS, AND EXHIBITS FILED UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Randall R. Rader on 6/15/2010. (ch, )
June 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 352 Joint MOTION TO MAKE PUBLIC PORTIONS OF CERTAIN BRIEFS, DECLARATIONS, AND EXHIBITS FILED UNDER SEAL by AOL LLC, Google Inc., Performance Pricing, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(O'Brien, Emily)
May 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 351 SEALED SUR-REPLY in Opposition to Motion re 343 SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs filed by Performance Pricing, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Lyon, Richard)
May 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 350 SEALED REPLY in Support of 343 SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs filed by AOL LLC, Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit L, # 2 Exhibit M, # 3 Exhibit N, # 4 Declaration of David A. Perlson in Support of Defendants' Reply)(Perlson, David)
April 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 349 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 343 SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs filed by Performance Pricing, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Affidavit Frechette Decl., # 9 Affidavit Dovel Decl., # 10 Exhibit A to Dovel Decl., # 11 Exhibit B to Dovel Decl.)(Lyon, Richard)
April 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 348 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 342 SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion for Taxation of Costs filed by AOL LLC, Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Perlson, David)
April 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 347 ORDER granting 344 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jamie Lisagor terminated for Google Inc. and AOL LLC. Signed by Judge Randall R. Rader on 4/22/10. (ehs, )
April 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 346 NOTICE of docketing re 341 Notice of Appeal - PATENT CASE from the USCA for the Federal Circuit and assigned case number 2010-1306 (ehs, )
April 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Appeal Remark re 341 Notice of Appeal - PATENT CASE : Transcript order form mailed to Richard Lyon. USCA for the Federal Circuit Court sent certified copies of the NOA, docket sheet and order appeal was based on (ehs, )
April 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 341 NOTICE OF APPEAL - PATENT CASE ( Receipt # 6-1-21734 $455.00) by Performance Pricing, Inc.. (Lyon, Richard) Modified on 4/7/2010 (ch, ).
April 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 340 ORDER granting 339 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Bill of Costs and Motions for Exceptional Case, Attorney Fees and Cost shall be due 4/8/2010. Signed by Judge Randall R. Rader on 4/5/2010. (ch, )
March 31, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 339 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Bill of Costs and Motions for Exceptional Case, Attorneys' Fees and Costs by AOL LLC, Google Inc., Performance Pricing, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lisagor, Jamie)
March 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 338 FINAL JUDGMENT - ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that: Judgment is entered in favor of Defendants on all of Plaintiffs claims; Judgment is entered in favor of Defendants on Defendants counterclaim for declaratory judgment of non-infringement; Defendants have not and are not infringing any claim of U.S. Patent No. 6,978,253; Defendants counterclaims for declaratory judgment of invalidity and unenforceability are dismissed without prejudice; The date of entry of this Final Judgment shall be the date of the entry of judgment in this case for all purposes, including but not limited to any demand for costs and/or attorneys fees and any post-judgments motions. Signed by Judge Randall R. Rader on 3/22/2010. (ch, )
March 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 337 NOTICE by Performance Pricing, Inc. re 336 Order, Joint Statement of Remaining Issues Pursuant to March 18, 2010 Order (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Final Judgment)(Lyon, Richard)
March 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 336 ORDER - granting 253 Sealed Motion for Summary Judgement. Summary judgment of non-infringement as to all asserted claims is therefore GRANTED. The parties are requested to file a joint statement by 3/19/2010, @ 5:00 pm, identifying any remaining issues in the case in light of summary judgment order. Signed by Judge Randall R. Rader on 3/17/2010. (ch, )
March 18, 2010 Opinion or Order ***FILED IN ERROR. PER JUDGES CHAMBERS - PLEASE IGNORE Document # 335, Order. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
March 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 335 ***FILED IN ERROR. PER JUDGES CHAMBERS. PLEASE IGNORE.***ORDER granting 253 Sealed Motion Summary Judgment. Summary judgment of non-infringement as to all asserted claims is therefore GRANTED. The parties are requested to file a joint statement by 3/19/2010, @ 5:00 pm, identifying any remaining issues in the case in light of this summary judgment order (see order for details). Signed by Judge Randall R. Rader on 3/18/2010. (ch, ) Modified on 3/18/2010 (dcap, ). Modified on 3/18/2010 (ch, ).
March 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 334 RESPONSE in Opposition re 333 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File filed by Performance Pricing, Inc.. (Lyon, Richard)
March 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 333 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File by Google Inc., AOL LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lisagor, Jamie)
March 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 332 ORDER granting 331 Unopposed Motion Regarding Deadlines. Motions in limine shall be due 3/15/2010., Replies to Daubert Motions shall be due 3/22/2010. Signed by Judge Randall R. Rader on 3/5/2010. (ch, )
March 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 331 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File by Google Inc., AOL LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(O'Brien, Emily)
March 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 330 Sealed Document. Plaintiff's Objections and Counter-Designations To Defendants Pre-Trial Disclosures (Attachments: # 1 Ex. 1, # 2 Ex. 2)(Lyon, Richard)
March 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 329 Sealed Defendants' Objections and Counter-Designations to Plaintiff's Pre-trial Disclosures (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(O'Brien, Emily)
March 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 328 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 302 SEALED MOTION to Compel 30(b)(6) Testimony filed by Performance Pricing, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 5, # 2 Exhibit 6)(Cho, Christin)
March 1, 2010 Opinion or Order ***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY Document # 325, Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Exclude. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (SEE CORRECTED DOCUMENT # 326)(ch, )
February 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 327 SEALED Defendants' Opposition to 304 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of W. Christopher Bakewell filed by Google Inc., AOL LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Text of Proposed Order)(O'Brien, Emily)
February 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 326 SEALED OPPOSITION to 303 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Michael I. Shamos filed by Google Inc., AOL LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Text of Proposed Order)(Lisagor, Jamie)
February 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 325 ***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY. PLEASE IGNORE.***RESPONSE in Opposition re 303 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Michael I. Shamos filed by Google Inc., AOL LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Text of Proposed Order)(Lisagor, Jamie) Modified on 3/1/2010 (ch, ).
February 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 324 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 307 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Testimony and Opinions of Mr. Robert Mills filed by Performance Pricing, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14)(Lyon, Richard)
February 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 323 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 306 SEALED MOTION to Exclude the Testimony and Opinions of Ms. Dana Todd filed by Performance Pricing, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8)(Lyon, Richard)
February 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 322 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 305 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Testimony and Opinions of Dr. Yannis Bakos filed by Performance Pricing, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Cho, Christin)
February 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 321 SEALED SUR-REPLY to 300 Opposed MOTION to Amend/Correct 16 Amended Complaint, filed by Google Inc. (O'Brien, Emily)
February 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 320 Sealed Document. Plaintiff Performance Pricing, Inc.'s Second Amended Pretrial Disclosures. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 3)(Lyon, Richard)
February 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 319 SEALED Opposition to 302 SEALED MOTION to Compel 30(b)(6) Testimony filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Emily C. O'Brien in Support of Google's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G, # 10 Exhibit H, # 11 Exhibit I, # 12 Exhibit J, # 13 Exhibit K, # 14 Exhibit L, # 15 Exhibit M, # 16 Text of Proposed Order)(O'Brien, Emily)
February 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 318 Sealed Defendants' First Amended Pretrial Disclosures by Defendants AOL LLC and Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Amended Attachment B)(O'Brien, Emily)
February 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 317 ORDER - granting 315 Joint Motion Regarding Pretrial Deadlines and Trial. Motions due by 3/5/2010., Proposed Pretrial Order due by 3/11/2010. All other deadlines are set forth herein. Signed by Judge Randall R. Rader on 2/18/2010. (ch, )
February 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 316 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 300 Opposed MOTION to Amend/Correct 16 Amended Complaint, filed by Performance Pricing, Inc. (Cho, Christin)
February 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 315 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File by Performance Pricing, Inc., Google Inc., AOL LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(O'Brien, Emily)
February 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 314 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(O'Brien, Emily)
February 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 313 Sealed Document. First Amended Pretrial Disclosures by Plaintiff. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 2, # 2 Exhibit 3)(Lyon, Richard) Modified on 2/9/2010 (sm, ).
February 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 312 Additional Attachments to Main Document: 311 Sealed Document.. (O'Brien, Emily)
February 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 311 Sealed Defendants Google Inc. and AOL LLC's Pre-trial Disclosures by Google Inc. and AOL LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Attachment A, # 3 Attachment B)(O'Brien, Emily)
February 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 310 Sealed Document. Pretrial Disclosures by Plaintiff (Attachments: # 1 Ex. 1, # 2 Ex. 2, # 3 Ex. 3)(Lyon, Richard) Modified on 2/9/2010 (sm, ).
February 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 309 SEALED OPPOSITION re 300 MOTION to Amend/Correct 16 Amended Complaint, filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Emily O'Brien in Support of Google's Opposition to Performance Pricing's Motion to Amend the Complaint)(O'Brien, Emily)
February 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 308 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document (Cert of Authority to seal): 304 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of W. Christopher Bakewell. (Lyon, Richard) Modified on 2/8/2010 (sm, ).
February 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 307 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Testimony and Opinions of Mr. Robert Mills by Google Inc., AOL LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Text of Proposed Order)(Lisagor, Jamie)
February 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 306 SEALED MOTION to Exclude the Testimony and Opinions of Ms. Dana Todd by Google Inc., AOL LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Text of Proposed Order)(Lisagor, Jamie)
February 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 305 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Testimony and Opinions of Dr. Yannis Bakos by Google Inc., AOL LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Lisagor, Jamie)
February 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 304 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of W. Christopher Bakewell by Performance Pricing, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Text of Proposed Order)(Lyon, Richard)
February 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 303 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Michael I. Shamos by Performance Pricing, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Text of Proposed Order)(Cho, Christin)
January 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 302 SEALED MOTION to Compel 30(b)(6) Testimony by Performance Pricing, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Cho decl., # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Text of Proposed Order)(Cho, Christin)
January 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 301 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document (Cert of Authority): 300 Opposed MOTION to Amend/Correct 16 Amended Complaint(Cho, Christin) Modified on 1/25/2010 (sm, ).
January 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 300 SEALED Opposed MOTION to Amend/Correct 16 Amended Complaint, by Performance Pricing, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Cho declaration, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Text of Proposed Order)(Cho, Christin) (SEALED PER ATTORNEY)Modified on 1/22/2010 (ch, ).
January 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 299 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 256 First SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment of Infringement filed by Performance Pricing, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 17, # 2 Exhibit 18, # 3 Exhibit 19, # 4 Exhibit 20, # 5 Exhibit 21)(Lyon, Richard)
January 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 298 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 258 SEALED MOTION for summary judgment re: no anticipation filed by Performance Pricing, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Yannis Bakos, PhD, # 2 Exhibit 6, # 3 Exhibit 7)(Lyon, Richard)
January 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 297 REPLY to Response to Motion re 255 SEALED MOTION for summary judgment re: section 112's written description requirement filed by Performance Pricing, Inc.. (Lyon, Richard)
January 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 296 ORDER - denying 248 Plaintiffs Motion to Compel the Deposition of Michelle Lee. Signed by Judge Randall R. Rader on 1/12/2010. (ch, )
January 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 295 ORDER granting 290 Motion for Adjustment and Clarification of Schedule. The following dates are vacated pending further Order of the court: Pretrial Conference previously scheduled for 3/18/2010., Jury Selection previously scheduled for 4/6/2010 and Trial date, previously scheduled for 4/12/2010. With regard to the parties briefing related to Dft's and Pla's Motions for Summary Judgment: Neither party shall be entitled to sur-reply briefing on the Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Randall R. Rader on 1/12/2010. (ch, )
January 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 294 SEALED REPLY in Support of Motion re 253 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement filed by Google Inc., AOL LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit J, # 2 Exhibit K)(Lisagor, Jamie)
January 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 293 SEALED REPLY in Support of Motion re 252 SEALED MOTION regarding Plaintiff's Claim of Willful Infringement filed by Google Inc., AOL LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit R)(Lisagor, Jamie)
January 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 292 SEALED REPLY in Support of Motion re 254 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity under 35 U.S.C. 102 and 103 filed by Google Inc., AOL LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit V, # 2 Exhibit W)(Lisagor, Jamie)
January 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 291 SEALED REPLY in Support of 251 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity under 35 U.S.C. 101 filed by Google Inc., AOL LLC. (Lisagor, Jamie)
January 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 290 Opposed MOTION to Amend/Correct Opposed Motion for Adjustment and Clarification of Schedule by Google Inc., AOL LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(O'Brien, Emily)
January 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 289 ORDER granting 288 Motion for Extension of Time to Extend Deadlines (see order for further details) Deadlines are extended as set forth herein. Signed by Judge Randall R. Rader on 1/7/2010. (ch, )
January 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 288 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Motion to Extend Deadlines by Performance Pricing, Inc., Google Inc., AOL LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Joint Motion to Extend Deadlines)(O'Brien, Emily)
December 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 287 SEALED Defendants' Opposition to 256 First SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment of Infringement filed by Google Inc., AOL LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Defendants' Expert Michael I. Shamos in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment of Infringement, # 2 Declaration of Jonathan Alferness in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment of Infringement, # 3 Declaration of Jonathan Alferness in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement, # 4 Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Jonathan Alferness in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement, # 5 Exhibit A, # 6 Exhibit B, # 7 Exhibit C, # 8 Exhibit D, # 9 Exhibit E, # 10 Exhibit F, # 11 Exhibit G, # 12 Exhibit H, # 13 Exhibit I, # 14 Exhibit J, # 15 Exhibit K)(O'Brien, Emily)
December 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 286 SEALED Defendants' Opposition to 258 SEALED MOTION for summary judgment re: no anticipation filed by Google Inc., AOL LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Defendants' Expert Michael I. Shamos in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment of No Anticipation, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G)(O'Brien, Emily)
December 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 285 SEALED Defendants' Opposition to 255 SEALED MOTION for summary judgment re: section 112's written description requirement filed by Google Inc., AOL LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Defendants' Expert Michael I. Shamos in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment Re: Section 112's Written Description Requirement, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B)(O'Brien, Emily)
December 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 284 RESPONSE in Opposition re 257 MOTION for Summary Judgment of patentability under 35 U.S.C. section 101 filed by Google Inc., AOL LLC. (O'Brien, Emily)
December 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 283 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 281 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Regarding Plaintiffs Motion for Summary Judgment filed 11/23/09. Dft's Oppositions are due on 12/30/09, and pla's Replies are due on 1/19/2010. Signed by Judge Randall R. Rader on 12/29/09. (ch, )
December 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 282 ORDER AMENDING DOCKET CONTROL ORDER - the deadlines set forth herein are amended as follows, all other deadlines contained in the Docket Control Order remain the same. Signed by Judge Randall R. Rader on 12/29/09. (ch, )
December 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 281 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadlines by Google Inc., AOL LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadlines)(O'Brien, Emily)
December 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Judge Randall R. Rader added. Judge Leonard Davis and Magistrate Judge John D. Love no longer assigned to case. (ehs, )
December 22, 2009 Opinion or Order *** Document # 280, Order was corrected to read that the docket was transferred to Judge Randall R Rader, not transferred to Washington DC..*** (ehs, )
December 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 280 Order TRANSFERRING case from the docket of Judge Leonard Davis to the docket of Randall R Rader (ehs, ).
December 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 279 SEALED OPPOSITION to 253 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement filed by Performance Pricing, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Yannis Bakos re: Infringement, # 2 Declaration of Yannis Bakos re: Validity, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6, # 9 Exhibit 7, # 10 Exhibit 8, # 11 Exhibit 9, # 12 Exhibit 10, # 13 Exhibit 11, # 14 Exhibit 12, # 15 Exhibit 13, # 16 Exhibit 14)(Lyon, Richard)
December 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 278 SEALED OPPOSITION to 254 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity under 35 U.S.C. 102 and 103 filed by Performance Pricing, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Yannis Bakos re: Validity, # 2 Declaration of Yannis Bakos re: Infringement, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5)(Lyon, Richard)
December 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 277 SEALED OPPOSITION to 251 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity under 35 U.S.C. 101 filed by Performance Pricing, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Yannis Bakos re: Infringement, # 2 Declaration of Yannis Bakos re: Validity, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6, # 9 Exhibit 7, # 10 Exhibit 8, # 11 Exhibit 9)(Lyon, Richard)
December 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 276 SEALED OPPOSITION to Motion re 252 SEALED MOTION regarding Plaintiff's Claim of Willful Infringement filed by Performance Pricing, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Cho, Christin)
December 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 275 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 248 First MOTION to Compel the Deposition of Michelle Lee filed by Google Inc.. (Jones, Michael)
December 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 274 REPLY to Response to Motion re 248 First MOTION to Compel the Deposition of Michelle Lee filed by Performance Pricing, Inc.. (Cho, Christin)
December 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 273 NOTICE by AOL LLC, Google Inc. Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (Beck, David)
December 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 272 ORDER granting 270 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney David J Beck and Michael Ernest Richardson terminated as counsel for Defendants Google Inc. and AOL LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 12/16/09. (ehs, )
December 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 271 ORDER granting 269 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply to Motion to Compel Deposition of Michelle Lee. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 12/15/09. (ehs, )
December 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 270 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Unopposed Motion to Allow David J. Beck and Michael E. Richardson to Withdraw as Counsel of Record for Defendants Google Inc. and AOL LLC by AOL LLC, Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Beck, David)
December 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 269 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiff's Reply to Motion to Compel the Deposition of Michelle Lee by Performance Pricing, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cho, Christin)
December 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 268 ORDER granting 265 Motion to Amend Mediation Order. The Court will extend the deadline until March 18, 2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 12/14/09. (ehs, )
December 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 267 ORDER granting 266 Motion for Extension of Time to File deadlinesRegarding Defendants Motions for Summary Judgment, filed November 18, 2009, Plaintiffs Oppositions shall be due December 21, 2009, and Defendants Replies shall be due January 11, 2010. Regarding Plaintiffs Motions for Summary Judgment, filed November 23, 2009, Defendants Oppositions shall be due December 28, 2009, and Plaintiffs Replies shall be due January 18, 2010. The Joint Pretrial Order, Joint Proposed Jury Instructions, Form of the Verdict, Proposed Finding of Fact and Conclusions of Law, and the Notice of Request for Daily Transcript or Real Time Reporting of the Court shall be due on January 22, 2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 12/14/09. (ehs, )
December 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 266 MOTION for Extension of Time to File re: summary judgment motion briefing schedule, joint pretrial order, joint proposed jury instructions, form of the verdict, proposed finding of fact and conclusions of law, notice of request for daily transcript or real time reporting of the court by Performance Pricing, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lyon, Richard)
December 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 265 Agreed MOTION to Amend/Correct Mediation Order by Performance Pricing, Inc., Google Inc., AOL LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Agreed Motion to Amend Mediation Order, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Alternative Proposed Order Granting Agreed Motion to Amend Mediation Order)(O'Brien, Emily)
December 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 264 SEALED Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel the Deposition of Michelle Lee filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Declaration of Emily C. O'Brien in Support of Google Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel the Deposition of Michelle Lee, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G)(O'Brien, Emily) Modified on 12/8/2009 (sm, ).
December 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 263 ORDER granting 262 Motion to Supplement Summary Judgment. ORDERED that Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. §§ 102 and 103 (Doc. No. 254) shall be supplemented to include the corrected Exhibit C. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 12/7/09. (ch, )
December 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 262 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct 254 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity under 35 U.S.C. 102 and 103 by Google Inc., AOL LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Tab 1, # 2 Tab 2, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Lisagor, Jamie)
December 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 261 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael E Jones on behalf of Google Inc., AOL LLC (Jones, Michael)
November 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 260 ORDER granting 259 Motion for Extension of Time to File certain deadlines. Opposition to Motion to Compel Deposition of Michelle Lee is extended until December 7, 2009; Daubert motion deadline is extended until January 8, 2010; and Daubert response deadline is extended until January 22, 2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 11/25/09. (ehs, )
November 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 259 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Extend Certain Deadlines by Google Inc., AOL LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Motion to Extend Certain Deadlines)(O'Brien, Emily)
November 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 258 SEALED MOTION for summary judgment re: no anticipation by Performance Pricing, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Cho, Christin) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/24/2009: # 6 Text of Proposed Order) (sm, ).
November 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 257 MOTION for Summary Judgment of patentability under 35 U.S.C. section 101 by Performance Pricing, Inc.. (Lyon, Richard) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/24/2009: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (sm, ).
November 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 256 First SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment of Infringement by Performance Pricing, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Bakos Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16)(Lyon, Richard) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/24/2009: # 18 Text of Proposed Order) (sm, ).
November 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 255 SEALED MOTION for summary judgment re: section 112's written description requirement by Performance Pricing, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Cho, Christin) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/24/2009: # 3 Text of Proposed Order) (sm, ).
November 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 254 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity under 35 U.S.C. 102 and 103 by Google Inc., AOL LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E-1, # 6 Exhibit E-2, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit N, # 16 Exhibit O, # 17 Exhibit P, # 18 Exhibit Q, # 19 Exhibit R, # 20 Exhibit S, # 21 Exhibit T, # 22 Exhibit U, # 23 Appendix A, # 24 Text of Proposed Order)(Lisagor, Jamie)
November 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 253 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement by Google Inc., AOL LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Declaration of Jonathan Alferness, # 11 Exhibit 1 to Alferness Declaration, # 12 Text of Proposed Order)(Lisagor, Jamie)
November 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 252 SEALED MOTION regarding Plaintiff's Claim of Willful Infringement by Google Inc., AOL LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Text of Proposed Order)(Lisagor, Jamie)
November 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 251 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity under 35 U.S.C. 101 by Google Inc., AOL LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Lisagor, Jamie)
November 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 250 ORDER granting 249 Motion for Extension of Time to File motions for summary judgment. Deadline extended to 11/23/09. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 11/18/09. (ehs, )
November 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 249 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motions for Summary Judgment by Performance Pricing, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cho, Christin)
November 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 248 First MOTION to Compel the Deposition of Michelle Lee by Performance Pricing, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Affidavit Cho Declaration)(Cho, Christin)
November 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 247 ORDER granting 246 Motion to Amend and Extend Deadlines. The deadline for parties to file their Daubert motions is extended to 11-24-2009 and the deadline for parties to file Daubert responses is extended to 12-22-2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 11/09/09. cc:attys 11-09-09 (mll, )
November 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 246 MOTION to Amend/Correct Defendants Unopposed Motion to Amend Order Granting Defendants' Motion to Extend Deadlines for Daubert Motions and Responses by AOL LLC, Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Beck, David)
November 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 245 ORDER granting 244 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Deadline for Dft to file their Daubert motions is extended to 11/24/09 and the deadline for plaintiff to file its Daubert responses is extended to 12/22/09. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 11/6/09. (ch, )
November 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 244 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadlines for Daubert Motions and Responses by AOL LLC, Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Beck, David)
October 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 243 ORDER denying 241 Motion to Compel Production of Documents by Third Parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 10/19/09. (ch, )
October 1, 2009 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John D. Love: Telephone Conference held on 10/1/2009. (Court Reporter M. Morris.) (mjm, )
September 25, 2009 Opinion or Order ***FILED BY CLERK BUT BEING ALLOWED PER JUDGE LOVE, THIS TIME ONLY, SO NO LONGER DEFICIENT RE: Document " Notice of Deficiency regarding #241 Motion and #242 Sealed Memo which are now being allowed filed the way they are, THIS TIME ONLY. Motion (241) has been unterminated per Judge. PLEASE IGNORE NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY.*** (sm, )
September 25, 2009 Opinion or Order ***PLEASE IGNORE, PER JUDGE, ***NOTICE of DEFICIENCY regarding the #241 and #242 submitted by Google Inc., AOL LLC due to motion and memo should be as one and include a cert of conference and show the appropriate case number and style re Motion to Compel and Sealed Memo in support. Correction should be made by 1 business day and refiled. Motion is terminated. (sm, ) Modified on 9/25/2009 (sm, ).
September 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 242 SEALED Supplemental Memorandum in Support of 241 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents by Third Parties Neal Cohen and Vista IP Law Group, LLP filed by Google Inc., AOL LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Supplemental Declaration of Emily C. O'Brien in Support of Motion to Compel, # 2 Exhibit Q, # 3 Second Supplemental Declaration of Emily C. O'Brien in Support of Motion to Compel, # 4 Exhibit R)(O'Brien, Emily) Modified on 9/25/2009 (sm, ). Modified on 9/25/2009 (sm, ).
September 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 241 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents by Third Parties Neal Cohen and Vista IP Law Group, LLP by AOL LLC, Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Joint Stipulation Regarding Defendant Google Inc. and AOL LLC's Motion to Compel Production of Documents by Third Parties Neal Cohen and Vista IP Law Group, LLP, # 2 Declaration of Emily C. O'Brien in Support of Motion to Compel, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G, # 10 Exhibit H, # 11 Exhibit I, # 12 Exhibit J, # 13 Exhibit K, # 14 Exhibit L, # 15 Exhibit M, # 16 Exhibit N, # 17 Exhibit O, # 18 Exhibit P, # 19 Declaration of Christin Cho in Opposition to Motion to Compel, # 20 Errata 1, # 21 Exhibit 2, # 22 Exhibit 3, # 23 Proposed Order Granting Defendant Google Inc. and AOL LLC's Motion to Compel)(O'Brien, Emily) Modified on 9/25/2009 (sm, ). Modified on 9/25/2009 (sm, ).
September 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 240 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Markman Hearing Proceedings held on 6/18/09 before Judge John D. Love in Tyler, Texas. Court Reporter: Shea Sloan, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov. 147 pages. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 10/15/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/26/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/23/2009. (sms, )
September 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 239 ORDER - Telephonic hearing is set for 10/1/09 @ 10:30 am. It is ORDERED that prior to the telephonic hearing, the Motion to Compel and all other relevant documents originally filed with the Central District of California are re-filed in the Eastern District of Texas. The parties will have until Friday, 9/25/09 at 4:00pm CSTto complete these filings with the Court (see order for further details). Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 9/23/09. (ch, ) Modified on 9/23/2009 (ch, ).
September 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 238 MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER -# 230 Plaintiffs Motion to Amend Infringement Contentions is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 9/15/09. (ehs, )
September 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 237 SEALED REPLY to Motion re 230 SEALED MOTION to amend infringement contentions filed by Performance Pricing, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 9, # 2 Exhibit 10, # 3 Exhibit 8)(Cho, Christin)
August 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 236 MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER granting in part and denying in part motion # 215 to compel documents. Google is ORDERED to make these documents available by September 11, 2009. Defendant Google is further ORDERED to re-produce a witness by September 25, 2009 for a limited Rule 30(b)(6) deposition, as outlined above. Prior to both dates, the parties are ORDERED to meet and confer regarding these issues and are strongly encouraged, going forward, to work together to resolve any remaining discovery disputes. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 8/31/09. (ehs, )
August 28, 2009 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Deficiency regarding document 235 submitted by Google Inc. The document is a Stand Alone Order. Clerk has attached order to document 228 (ljw, )
August 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 235 PLEASE IGNORE, FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY, CLERK HAS ATTACHED THIS ORDER TO DOCUMENT 228 Additional Attachments to Main Document: 228 Sealed Response to Motion (Beck, David) Modified on 8/28/2009 (ljw, ).
August 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 234 SEALED RESPONSE to 230 SEALED MOTION to amend infringement contentions filed by Google Inc., AOL LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Lisagor, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Text of Proposed Order)(Lisagor, Jamie)
August 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 233 SEALED SUR-REPLY in Opposition to 215 MOTION to Compel documents regarding Google's calculation of actual cost per click and quality score filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Sistos, # 2 Exhibit O, # 3 Exhibit P, # 4 Exhibit Q, # 5 Exhibit R)(Sistos, Antonio)
August 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 232 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 230 SEALED MOTION to amend infringement contentions. (Cho, Christin)
August 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 231 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER - For all the foregoing reasons, the Court construes the disputed claim language in this casein the manner set forth herein. For the ease of reference, the Courts claim interpretations are setforth in a table attached to this opinion as Appendix A. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 8/13/09. (ch, )
August 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 230 SEALED MOTION to amend infringement contentions by Performance Pricing, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Cho declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit 6, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit 7)(Cho, Christin)
August 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 229 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 215 MOTION to Compel documents regarding Google's calculation of actual cost per click and quality score filed by Performance Pricing, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Cho, # 2 Affidavit Declaration of Dovel, # 3 Exhibit 5)(Cho, Christin)
July 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 228 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 215 MOTION to Compel documents regarding Google's calculation of actual cost per click and quality score filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Sistos Decl. ISO Google's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit N)(Sistos, Antonio) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/28/2009: # 16 Text of Proposed Order) (ljw, ).
July 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 227 DEFENDANTS' JOINT SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE BRIEF ON CLAIM CONSTRUCTION filed by Google Inc., AOL LLC. (Perlson, David)
July 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 226 ORDER granting 225 Motion for Extension of Time to File Supplemental Response Brief on Claim Construction. Deadline is extended to 7/30/09. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 7/29/09. (ch, )
July 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 225 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Supplemental Response Brief on Claim Construction by Google Inc., AOL LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Sistos, Antonio)
July 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 224 ORDER granting 223 Motion for Leave to File to file a response to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Documents Regarding Google's Calculation of Actual Cost Per Click and Quality Score Deadline is extended to and including July 30, 2009.. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 7/24/09. (ehs, )
July 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 223 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Extend Deadline for Responding to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Documents Regarding Google's Calculations of Actual Cost Per Click and Quality Score by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Beck, David)
July 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 222 SUPPLEMENTAL CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Performance Pricing, Inc. (Cho, Christin)
July 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 221 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Richard E Lyon on behalf of Performance Pricing, Inc. (Lyon, Richard)
July 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 220 ORDER granting 219 Motion for Extension of Time to File. New deadline for Plaintiff to submit the further limited claim construction briefing under section 4 (pp. 4-5) of the Court's July 15, 2009 Order is Wednesday, 7/22/09 and the new deadline for Defendants to submit its response is Tuesday, 7/28/09. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 7/17/09. (ch, )
July 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 219 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Further Limited Claim Construction Briefing by Performance Pricing, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cho, Christin)
July 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 218 ORDER setting forth the Court's initial constructions for the disputed claim term as set forth herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 7/15/09. (ehs, )
July 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 217 ORDER granting 216 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Nancy Claire Abernathy terminated as counsel for Performance Pricing Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 7/14/09. (ehs, )
July 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 216 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney N. Claire Abernathy by Performance Pricing, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
July 7, 2009 Opinion or Order NOTICE BY CLERK - Per request from attorney Motion to Compel was sealed (ch, )
July 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 215 SEALED MOTION to Compel documents regarding Google's calculation of actual cost per click and quality score by Performance Pricing, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4)(Cho, Christin) Modified on 7/7/2009 (ch, ).
July 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ORDER granting 213 Motion to Dismiss. All claims asserted by plaintiff Performance Pricing, Inc. against defendant Microsoft in this suit are hereby dismissed with prejudice, and that all counterclaims asserted by defendant Microsoft against plaintiff Performance Pricing, Inc. in this suit are hereby dismissed without prejudice. It is further ORDERED that all attorneys' fees and costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 7/1/09. (ch, )
June 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 213 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice Microsoft Corporation by Performance Pricing, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order of Dismissal with Prejudice as to Microsoft Corporation)(Cho, Christin)
June 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 212 ORDER granting 210 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Deadlines are set forth herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 6/22/09. (ch, )
June 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 211 NOTICE by Performance Pricing, Inc. (Notice of Filing of P.R. 4-5(d) Joint Claim Construction Chart) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
June 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 210 Joint MOTION to extend deadlines for expert disclosures, discovery and dispositive motions by Performance Pricing, Inc., Google Inc., AOL LLC, Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Joint Motion to Extend Deadlines for Expert Disclosures, Discovery and Dispositive Motions)(O'Brien, Emily) Modified on 6/22/2009 (ljw, ).
June 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 209 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John D. Love: Markman Hearing held on 6/18/2009. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (mjm, )
June 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 208 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Roger Brian Craft on behalf of Microsoft Corporation (Craft, Roger)
June 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 207 DEFENDANTS' JOINT SUR-REPLY BRIEF ON CLAIM CONSTRUCTION filed by Google Inc., AOL LLC, Microsoft Corporation. (Perlson, David)
June 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 206 ORDER granting 204 Motion for Extension of Time to comply with Patent Rule 4-5(d) Deadline reset to June 12, 2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 6/22/09. (ehs, )
June 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 205 ORDER granting 202 Motion for Extension of Time. Deadline for the first round of mediation is August 13, 2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 6/12/09. (ehs, )
June 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 204 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Motion to Extend Deadline for Patent Rule 4-5(d) Filing by AOL LLC, Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Joint Motion to Extend Deadline for Patent Rule 4-5(d) Filing)(O'Brien, Emily)
June 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 203 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Bryan K Anderson for Microsoft Corporation. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-1-4745) (ehs, )
June 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 202 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Motion to Extend Deadline for First Round of Mediation by AOL LLC, Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Joint Motion to Extend Deadline for First Round of Mediation)(O'Brien, Emily)
June 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER granting 197 Motion to Dismiss. All claims and counterclaims asserted by plaintiff Performance Pricing, Inc. in this suit between plaintiff Performance Pricing, Inc. and defendant Yahoo! Inc., are hereby dismissed with prejudice, and that all counterclaims asserted by defendant Yahoo! Inc. in this suit are hereby dismissed without prejudice. It is further ORDERED that all attorneys fees and costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 6/10/09. (ch, )
June 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 200 NOTICE by Performance Pricing, Inc. Notice of Estimate of Time Needed for Markman Hearing (Cho, Christin)
June 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ORDER granting 196 Agreed Motion for Extension of Certain Deadlines and Page Limits. ORDERED that Plaintiff Performance Pricing, Inc. may file its Reply Claim Construction Brief on or before June 8, 2009 and may have an additional eight (8) pages in which to file their Reply Claim Construction Brief for a total of eighteen (18) pages. It is further ORDERED that Defendants may file a Sur-Reply Claim Construction Briefon or before June 12, such brief not to exceed 10 pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 6/8/09. (ch, )
June 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 198 PLAINTIFF'S REPLY CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Performance Pricing, Inc.. (Cho, Christin)
June 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 197 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice as to Yahoo!, Inc. by Performance Pricing, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Yahoo!, Inc.)(Cho, Christin)
June 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 196 Agreed MOTION to Extend Certain Deadlines and Page Limits re 192 Claim Construction Brief, by Performance Pricing, Inc.(a Texas Corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
June 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 195 NOTICE by AOL LLC, Google Inc. re 192 Claim Construction Brief, Notice of Submission of Copies of Unpublished Cases Cited in Defendants' Joint Response Brief on Claim Construction (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Beck, David)
May 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER granting 179 Motion to Compel. Courts ruling set forth herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 5/27/09. (ehs, )
May 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER granting 191 Motion for Extension of Time for First Round of Mediation. ORDERED that the new deadline for the first round of mediation is 7/31/09. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 5/18/09. (ch, )
May 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 192 DEFENDANTS' JOINT RESPONSE BRIEF ON CLAIM CONSTRUCTION filed by Google Inc., AOL LLC, Microsoft Corp., and Yahoo! Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Antonio Sistos ISO Defendants' Joint Response Brief on Claim Construction, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8)(Sistos, Antonio)
May 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 191 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Motion to Extend Deadline for First Round of Mediation by AOL LLC, Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(O'Brien, Emily)
May 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 190 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daymon Jeffrey Rambin on behalf of Performance Pricing, Inc.(a Texas Corporation) (Rambin, Daymon)
April 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 189 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re 179 MOTION to Compel 30(b)(6) Testimony and Interrogatory Responses from Google Declaration of Emily C. O'Brien in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Sur-Reply in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel 30(b)(6) Testimony and Interrogatory Responses filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6)(O'Brien, Emily)
April 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 188 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 179 MOTION to Compel 30(b)(6) Testimony and Interrogatory Responses from Google filed by Google Inc.. (Perlson, David)
April 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 187 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Performance Pricing, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16)(Cho, Christin)
April 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 186 REPLY to Response to Motion re 179 MOTION to Compel 30(b)(6) Testimony and Interrogatory Responses from Google filed by Performance Pricing, Inc.. (Cho, Christin)
April 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER granting 184 Motion for Extension of Time to submit Technology Tutorials to the Court. Deadline extended to 4/3/09. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 4/3/09. (ehs, )
April 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 184 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Technology Tutorials to the Court) by Performance Pricing, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Abernathy, Nancy) Modified on 4/3/2009 (sm, ).
April 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 183 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re 179 MOTION to Compel 30(b)(6) Testimony and Interrogatory Responses from Google Declaration of Emily O'Brien in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel 30(b)(6) Testimony and Interrogatory Responses filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Errata J, # 11 Exhibit K)(O'Brien, Emily)
April 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 182 RESPONSE in Opposition re 179 MOTION to Compel 30(b)(6) Testimony and Interrogatory Responses from Google filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Perlson, David)
March 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER granting 180 Motion for Extension of Time to File technical tutorials to the Court. Deadline extended to 4/2/09. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 3/25/09. (ehs, )
March 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 180 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Motion for Extension of Deadline to Submit Technology Tutorials by AOL LLC, Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Beck, David)
March 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 179 MOTION to Compel 30(b)(6) Testimony and Interrogatory Responses from Google by Performance Pricing, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cho, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cho, Christin)
March 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER granting 177 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Katherine H Bennett terminated as counsel for Google Inc. and AOL LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 3/17/09. (ch, )
March 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 177 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Unopposed Motion for Withdrawal of Counsel (Katherine H. Bennett) by AOL LLC, Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Beck, David)
March 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 176 NOTICE by Performance Pricing, Inc., Google Inc., AOL LLC, Microsoft Corporation, Yahoo! Inc. Joint Notice Regarding a Proposed Technical Advisor (Jones, Michael)
March 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 175 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Jamie Lisagor for Google Inc. and AOL LLC. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-1-4553 (ch, )
March 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER granting 170 Motion to Dismiss. All claims and counterclaims asserted by plaintiff Performance Pricing, Inc. in this suit between plaintiff Performance Pricing, Inc. and defendant IAC Search & Media, Inc., are hereby dismissed with prejudice, and that all counterclaims asserted by defendant IAC Search & Media, Inc. in this suit are hereby dismissedwithout prejudice, subject to the terms of that certain agreement entitled RELEASE AGREEMENT, dated February 12, 2009.It is further ORDERED that all attorneys fees and costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 3/4/09. (ch, )
March 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER granting 172 Motion for Extension of Time to Provide Technical Tutorials. deadline for the parties to provide technical tutorials is extended until and through March 26,2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 3/4/09. (ch, )
March 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 172 MOTION for Extension of Time to File JointMotion for Extension of Deadline to Provide Technical Tutorials by AOL LLC, Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Beck, David)
March 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER granting 169 Motion for Extension of Time to File proposed Technical Advisors. Deadline extended to 3/13/09. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 3/3/09. (ehs, )
March 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 170 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice as to IAC Search & Media, Inc. by Performance Pricing, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cho, Christin)
February 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 169 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Technical Advisors by Performance Pricing, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cho, Christin) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/3/2009: # 2 Revised Order) (sm, ).
February 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER granting 167 Motion extension of time to provide proposed Technical Advisors. Deadline extended to 1/17/09. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 2/17/09. (ehs, )
February 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 167 Joint MOTION Extension of Deadlin to Provide Proposed Technical Advisors re 163 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Second) by Performance Pricing, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., AOL LLC, Microsoft Corporation, Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bufe, John)
February 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 166 NOTICE by Performance Pricing, Inc. Parties' Compliance with Patent Rule 4-3 (Cho, Christin)
February 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER granting 164 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The new deadline for the parties to file their P.R. 4-3 Joint Claim Construction and Pre-hearing Statement is February 12, 2009.. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 2/11/09. (ehs, )
February 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 164 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File PR 4-3 Joint Claim Construction Chart and Prehearing Statement by Performance Pricing, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., AOL LLC, Microsoft Corporation, Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
February 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER granting 162 Motion for extension of deadlines to provide proposed Technical Advisors. Deadline extended to 2/13/09. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 2/2/09. (ehs, )
January 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 162 Joint MOTION for Extension of Deadline to Provide Proposed Technical Advisors by Performance Pricing, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., AOL LLC, Microsoft Corporation, Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
January 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER granting 160 Motion to Amend docket control order regarding the PR 4-3 deadlines. Deadline extended to 2/10/09 to file Joint Claim Constructionand Pre-hearing statement. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 1/27/09. (ehs, )
January 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 160 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 99 Order,,, Set Deadlines/Hearings,, by Performance Pricing, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., AOL LLC, Microsoft Corporation, Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
January 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 159 NOTICE by Microsoft Corporation Notice of Change of Contact Information (Findlay, Eric)
January 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 158 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney David Taylor Rudolph for AOL LLC. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-1-4383 (ch, )
December 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER granting 156 Joint Motion to Extend Deadline for First Round of Mediation. New deadline for the first round of mediation is 5/15/09. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 12/17/08. (ch, )
December 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 156 Joint MOTION to Extend the Mediation Deadline by Performance Pricing, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., AOL LLC, Microsoft Corporation, Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
December 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER granting 154 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Deadline for serving preliminary claim constructions and identification of extrinsic evidence is 12/23/08. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 12/12/08. (ehs, )
December 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 154 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Regarding PR 4-2, Deadline for Exchange of Preliminary Claim Constructions and Extrinsic Evidence by Performance Pricing, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., AOL LLC, Microsoft Corporation, Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
December 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER granting 152 Motion for Extension of Time for Exchange of Preliminary Claim Constructions and Extrinsic Evidence. New deadline for serving preliminary claim constructions and identification of extrinsic evidence is 12/12/08. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 12/5/08. (ch, )
December 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 152 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Joint Motion to Extend Deadlines for Exchange of Preliminary Claim Constructions and Extrinsic Evidence by AOL LLC, Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Beck, David)
December 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 151 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Joshua Sohn for Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc. and AOL LLC. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 6-1-16089 (ch, )
November 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER granting 149 Motion to Dismiss. All claims between Plaintiff and Dft A9.com Inc. are hereby dismissed with prejudice. All attorney fees and costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/21/08. (ch, )
November 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 149 MOTION to Dismiss (Stipulated Motion For Dismissal With Prejudice As To A9.com) by Performance Pricing, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order of Dismissal with Prejudice as to A9.com)(Cho, Christin)
November 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 148 NOTICE by Performance Pricing, Inc. Of Proposed Terms and Claim Elements for Construction Pursuant to P.R. 4-1 (Cho, Christin) Modified on 11/4/2008 (sm, ).
October 31, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 147 NOTICE of Disclosure by Microsoft Corporation of Defendants' First Amended Invalidity Contentions (Kolb, Laura)
October 31, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER granting 145 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Deadline extended to 11/3/08. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 10/31/08. (ch, )
October 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 145 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery To Extend Deadline For Exchange Of Proposed Terms And Claim Elements For Construction Under Patent Rule 4-1 by A9.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Love, Jeffrey)
October 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER granting 143 Motion to Amend/Correct Dft's Invalidity Contentions. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 10/30/08. (ch, )
October 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 143 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct Invalidity Contentions by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kolb, Laura)
October 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 142 NOTICE of Disclosure by IAC Search & Media, Inc. (Additional Disclosures pursuant to Discovery Order) (Maloney, Collin)
October 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 141 NOTICE of Disclosure by Yahoo! Inc. regarding Paragraph 2(c) (Jones, Michael)
October 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 140 NOTICE of Disclosure by Performance Pricing, Inc. (Cho, Christin)
October 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 139 NOTICE of Disclosure by Microsoft Corporation (Kolb, Laura)
October 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 138 NOTICE of Disclosure by A9.com, Inc. Notice of Compliance with Disclosure Requirements (Cruzen, Robert)
October 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 137 NOTICE by Google Inc. Notice of Compliance with Disclosure Requirements (Beck, David)
October 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 136 NOTICE by AOL LLC Notice of Compliance with Disclosure Requirements (Beck, David)
September 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 135 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Katherine H Bennett for AOL LLC, Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc. (FEE PAID) 2-1-4066 (ehs, )
August 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 134 NOTICE by IAC Search & Media, Inc. Of Compliance With Patent Rules 3-3 and 3-4 (Maloney, Collin)
August 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 133 NOTICE of Disclosure by Microsoft Corporation of Compliance with Patent Rules 3-3 and 3-4 (McBride, John)
August 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 132 NOTICE by AOL LLC AOL LLC's Notice of Compliance with Patent Rules 3-3 and 3-4 (Beck, David)
August 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 131 NOTICE by A9.com, Inc. of Compliance with Patent Rules 3-3 and 3-4 (Love, Jeffrey)
August 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 130 NOTICE of Disclosure by A9.com, Inc. Supplemental Initial Disclosure (Love, Jeffrey)
August 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 129 NOTICE of Disclosure by Yahoo! Inc. Regarding PR 3-3 and 3-4 (Jones, Michael)
August 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 128 NOTICE by Google Inc. Notice of Compliance with Patent Rules 3-3 and 3-4 (Beck, David)
July 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER granting 126 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Deadline extended to 8/6/08. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 7/29/08. (ehs, )
July 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 126 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Regarding PR 3-3 and 3-4, Unopposed by Google Inc., A9.com, Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., AOL LLC, Microsoft Corporation, Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
July 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 125 TRANSCRIPT of Status Conferences held on 4/7/08 before Judges Leonard Davis and John Love. Court Reporter: Shea Sloan, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 8/7/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/18/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/15/2008. 13 pages. See 87 (sms, )
July 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER granting 121 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Inge A Larish terminated as counsel for Dft A9.com, Inc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 7/13/08. (ch, )
July 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 123 AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 7/13/08. (ch, )
July 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 122 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Robert T Cruzen for A9.com, Inc.. (FEE PAID) 2-1-3938 (ehs, )
July 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 121 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Inge A. Larish by A9.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Love, Jeffrey)
July 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 120 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Performance Pricing, Inc., Google Inc., A9.com, Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., AOL LLC, Microsoft Corporation, Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Attachment A to Agreed Protective Order)(Jones, Michael)
July 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 119 NOTICE by AOL LLC Notice of Compliance with Disclosure Requirements (Beck, David)
July 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 118 NOTICE by Google Inc. Notice of Compliance with Disclosure Requirements (Beck, David)
June 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 117 NOTICE by IAC Search & Media, Inc. of Service of Initial Disclosures (Maloney, Collin)
June 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 116 NOTICE of Disclosure by Yahoo! Inc. (Jones, Michael)
June 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER granting 111 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File a Joint, Proposed Protective Order or Competing Versions thereof. Deadline is extended to 7/8/08. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 6/30/08. (ch, )
June 27, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 114 NOTICE of Disclosure by A9.com, Inc. (Love, Jeffrey)
June 27, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 113 NOTICE of Disclosure by Microsoft Corporation pursuant to Discovery Order (Kolb, Laura)
June 27, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 112 NOTICE of Disclosure by Performance Pricing, Inc. of Service of Initial Disclosures (Ainsworth, Charles)
June 27, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 111 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Joint, Proposed Protective Order or Competeing Versions Thereof by Performance Pricing, Inc., Google Inc., A9.com, Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., AOL LLC, Microsoft Corporation, Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
June 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 110 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Robert Leo Burns, II for AOL LLC. (FEE PAID) 2-1-3872 (ehs, )
June 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER granting 108 Motion for Extension of deadlines. Deadlines for filing Protective Order and initial disclosures is reset for 6/27/08. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 6/16/08. (ehs, )
June 13, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 108 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Motion to Extend Deadlines for Filing Protective Order and Serving Initial Disclosures by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Beck, David)
June 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 107 NOTICE by Performance Pricing, Inc. (Plaintiff's Notice of First Amended Disclosure of Asserted Claims and Infringement Contentions under P.R. 3-1) (Abernathy, Nancy)
June 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER granting 105 Agreed Amended Motion for Leave to Amend Plaintiffs Disclosure of Asserted Claims and Infringement Contentions. Plaintiffs may serve its First Amended Disclosure of Asserted Claims and Infringement Contentions. Dfts are hereby granted an extension fo 7/30/08 to comply with Patent Rules 3-3 and 3-4. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 6/9/08. (ch, )
June 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 105 Consent MOTION (Agreed Amended Motion for Leave to Amend Plaintiff's Disclosure of Asserted Claims and Infringement Contentions Regarding Defendants Microsoft Corporation and IAC Search & Media, Inc. and Motion for Extension for Defendants to Comply with Patent Rules 3-3 and 3-4) by Performance Pricing, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A - First Amended Disclosure of Asserted Claims and Infringement Contentions under P.R. 3-1, # 3 Appendix A to Exhibit A)(Abernathy, Nancy)
June 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER granting 103 Motion for leave to amend pltf's disclosure of asserted claim and infringement contentions. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 6/6/08. (ehs, )
June 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 103 Consent MOTION (Agreed Motion for Leave to Amend Plaintiff's Disclosure of Asserted Claims and Infringement Contentions Regarding Defendants Microsoft Corporation and IAC Search & Media, Inc.) by Performance Pricing, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's First Amended Disclosure of Asserted Claims and Infringement Contentions under P.R. 3-1, # 3 Appendix to Exhibit A)(Abernathy, Nancy)
May 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediator. Edward A Infante added as Mediator. Mediation deadline 1/30/2009 (1st Round) 12/18/2009 (2nd Round). Signed by Judge Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 5/19/08. (ch, )
May 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 101 NOTICE by Performance Pricing, Inc., Google Inc., A9.com, Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., AOL LLC, Microsoft Corporation, Yahoo! Inc. of Agreed Proposed Mediator (Jones, Michael)
May 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 100 NOTICE by Performance Pricing, Inc. of P.R. 3-1 and P.R. 3-2 Disclosures (Cho, Christin)
May 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 99 AGREED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER -Amended Pleadings due by 10/23/2009. Discovery due by 10/16/2009. Expert Witness List due by 8/17/2009. Markman Hearing set for 6/18/2009 09:00 AM before Judge John D. Love. Motions due by 2/25/2010. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 1/12/2010. Jury Selection set for 4/6/2010 09:00AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Jury Trial set for 4/12/2010 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Signed by Judge John D. Love on 5/14/08. (ehs, ) Modified on 9/30/2008 to correct Judge for Markman Hrg on 6/18/2009(rlf, ).
May 13, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 98 Joint MOTION for Entry of Proposed Docket Control Order by Performance Pricing, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cho, Christin)
May 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 97 Joint MOTION for Entry of Proposed Docket Control Order by Performance Pricing, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Docket Control Order)(Cho, Christin)
May 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 96 DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Judge John D. Love on 5/9/08. (ch, )
May 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 95 Joint MOTION For Entry of Proposed Discovery Order by Performance Pricing, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Discovery Order)(Cho, Christin)
April 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER granting 93 Motion for Extension of Time to File proposed discovery and docket control orders. Deadline extended to 5/8/08. Signed by Judge John D. Love on 4/28/08. (ehs, )
April 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 93 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Discovery and Docket Control Orders by Google Inc., A9.com, Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., AOL LLC, Microsoft Corporation, Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
April 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER granting 91 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Deadline for Plaintiff and Dft's to file their proposed Discovery Order and Docket Control Order shall be extended to and including 4/28/08. Signed by Judge John D. Love on 4/17/08. (ch, )
April 17, 2008 Opinion or Order ***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 90, Consent Motion for Extension of Time. PLEASE IGNORE. See Corrected Document # 91, *** (ch, )
April 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 91 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Discovery and Docket Control Orders by Google Inc., A9.com, Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., AOL LLC, Microsoft Corporation, Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bufe, John)
April 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ***FILED IN ERROR. SEE CORRECTED DOCUMENT # 91 *** Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Discovery and Docket Control Order by Google Inc., A9.com, Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., AOL LLC, Microsoft Corporation, Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bufe, John) Modified on 4/17/2008 (ch, ).
April 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 89 NOTICE by Performance Pricing, Inc. Notice of Change of Firm Name and Electronic Addresses (DeRieux, Elizabeth)
April 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER setting hearing deadlines. Parties to submit agreed Docket Control and Discovery Orders to the Court by 4/21/08. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/18/2010 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Jury Selection set for 4/6/2010 09:00AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Jury Trial set for 4/12/2019 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Markman Hearing set for 6/18/2009 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge John D. Love. Signed by Judge John D. Love on 4/10/08. (ehs, )
April 7, 2008 Opinion or Order E-Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis and Judge John D. Love : Status Conference held on 4/7/2008. See Document #87. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (mjm, )
April 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 87 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis and Judge John Love : Status Conference held on 4/7/2008. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign-In Sheet) (rlf, )
March 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 86 NOTICE of Designation of Attorney in Charge to Jeffrey S Love on behalf of A9.com, Inc. (Love, Jeffrey)
March 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER granting 82 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Harry Lee Gillam, Jr terminated. Signed by Judge John D. Love on 3/19/08. (ehs, )
March 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 84 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Ernest Richardson on behalf of AOL LLC (Richardson, Michael)
March 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 83 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David J Beck on behalf of AOL LLC (Beck, David)
March 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 82 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by AOL LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gillam, Harry)
March 13, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 81 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Inge A Larish on behalf of A9.com, Inc. (Larish, Inge)
March 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 80 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Charles K Verhoeven on behalf of IAC Search & Media, Inc. (Verhoeven, Charles)
March 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 79 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Emily C O'Brien on behalf of IAC Search & Media, Inc. (O'Brien, Emily)
March 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 78 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David A Perlson on behalf of IAC Search & Media, Inc. (Perlson, David)
March 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 77 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jennifer A Kash on behalf of IAC Search & Media, Inc. (Kash, Jennifer)
March 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 76 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Antonio Sistos on behalf of IAC Search & Media, Inc. (Sistos, Antonio)
March 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 75 Status Conference set for 4/7/2008 01:30 PM before Judge Leonard Davis and Magistrate Judge John D. Love in Tyler Courtroom.. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 3/7/08. (ch, )
February 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE SET FEBRUARY 28, 2008 AT 1:30 P.M. BEFORE JUDGE JOHN D. LOVE. (srg, )
January 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 73 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Ernest Richardson on behalf of Google Inc. (Richardson, Michael)
January 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 72 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Laura L Kolb for Microsoft Corporation. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 2-1-3421 (ch, )
January 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 71 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney John W McBride for Microsoft Corporation. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 2-1-3421 (ch, )
January 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 70 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Richard A Cederoth for Microsoft Corporation. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 2-1-3421 (ch, )
January 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 69 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney David T Pritikin for Microsoft Corporation. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 2-1-3421 (ch, )
January 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ***REPLACES #59***ANSWER to Counterclaim of Yahoo! Inc. by Performance Pricing, Inc..(Cho, Christin) Modified on 1/3/2008 (mpv, ).
January 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ***REPLACES #60***ANSWER to Counterclaim of Microsoft Corporation by Performance Pricing, Inc..(Cho, Christin) Modified on 1/3/2008 (mpv, ).
January 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ***REPLACES #61*** ANSWER to Counterclaim of A9.com by Performance Pricing, Inc..(Cho, Christin) Modified on 1/3/2008 (mpv, ).
January 2, 2008 Opinion or Order ***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 59, 60 and 61, ANSWER. PLEASE IGNORE. PER ATTY ERRORS in Documents, attorney to refile corrected documents within one business day.*** (mpv, )
December 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 68 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Jennifer A Kash for Google Inc. and AOL LLC. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 2-1-3347 (ch, )
December 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ANSWER to Counterclaim of IAC Search & Media, Inc. by Performance Pricing, Inc..(Cho, Christin) Certificate of Service added on 12/27/2007 (mpv, ). Modified on 12/27/2007 (mpv, ).
December 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ANSWER to Counterclaim of Google Inc. by Performance Pricing, Inc..(Cho, Christin) Certificate of Service added on 12/27/2007 (mpv, ). Modified on 12/27/2007 (mpv, ).
December 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ANSWER to Counterclaim of AOL LLC by Performance Pricing, Inc..(Cho, Christin) Certificate of Service added on 12/27/2007 (mpv, ). Modified on 12/27/2007 (mpv, ).
December 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ***FILED IN ERROR; PLEASE IGNORE***ANSWER to Counterclaim of A9.com, Inc. by Performance Pricing, Inc..(Cho, Christin)Certificate of Service added on 12/27/2007 (mpv, ). Modified on 12/27/2007 (mpv, ). Modified on 1/2/2008 (mpv, ).
December 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ***FILED IN ERROR; PLEASE IGNORE*** ANSWER to Counterclaim of Microsoft Corporation by Performance Pricing, Inc..(Cho, Christin) Certificate of Service added on 12/27/2007 (mpv, ). Modified on 12/27/2007 (mpv, ). Modified on 1/2/2008 (mpv, ).
December 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ***FILED IN ERROR; PLEASE IGNORE*** ANSWER to Counterclaim of Yahoo! Inc. by Performance Pricing, Inc..(Cho, Christin) Certificate of Service added on 12/27/2007 (mpv, ). Modified on 12/27/2007 (mpv, ). Modified on 1/2/2008 (mpv, ).
December 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 58 Notice of Scheduling Conference, Proposed Discovery Order, and Proposed Dates for Docket Control Order Scheduling Conference set for 2/28/2008 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge John D. Love.. Signed by Judge John D. Love on 12/21/07. (ch, )
December 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 57 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Emily C O'Brien for Google Inc. and AOL LLC. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 2-1-3326 (ch, )
December 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 56 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Antonio Sistos for Google Inc. and AOL LLC. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 2-1-3327 (ch, )
December 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 55 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney David A Perlson for Google Inc. and AOL LLC. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 2-1-3328 (ch, )
December 14, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 54 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Collin Michael Maloney on behalf of IAC Search & Media, Inc. (Maloney, Collin)
December 13, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ANSWER to Amended Complaint and, COUNTERCLAIM against Performance Pricing, Inc. by IAC Search & Media, Inc..(Carroll, Otis)
December 13, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 52 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Charles K Verhoeven for Google Inc. and AOL LLC. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 2-1-3316 (ch, )
December 7, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 51 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Google Inc. identifying None as Corporate Parent. (Beck, David)
December 7, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ANSWER to Amended Complaint , Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint, and, COUNTERCLAIM against Performance Pricing, Inc. by Google Inc..(Beck, David)
December 7, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 49 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by AOL LLC identifying None as Corporate Parent. (Gillam, Harry)
December 7, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ANSWER to Amended Complaint AOL LLC's Answer and Counterclaims to Performance Pricing, Inc.'s Amended Complaint for Patent Infringement, COUNTERCLAIM against Performance Pricing, Inc. by AOL LLC.(Gillam, Harry)
December 7, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 47 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by A9.com, Inc. identifying Amazon.com, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Tindel, Andy)
December 7, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 46 A9.com, Inc.'s ANSWER to Amended Complaint , Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against Performance Pricing, Inc. by A9.com, Inc..(Tindel, Andy)
December 7, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 45 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Microsoft Corporation identifying None as Corporate Parent. (Findlay, Eric)
December 7, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ANSWER to Amended Complaint , Affirmative Defenses, and, COUNTERCLAIM against Performance Pricing, Inc. by Microsoft Corporation.(Findlay, Eric)
December 7, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 43 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Jeffrey S Love for A9.com, Inc. (FEE PAID) 2-1-3306 (ehs, )
December 7, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 42 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Kristin L Cleveland for A9.com, Inc. (FEE PAID) 2-1-3305 (ehs, )
December 7, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 41 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Yahoo! Inc. identifying None as Corporate Parent. (Jones, Michael)
December 7, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ANSWER to Amended Complaint , Affirmative Defenses, and, COUNTERCLAIM against Performance Pricing, Inc. by Yahoo! Inc..(Jones, Michael)
November 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge John D. Love to conduct pre-trial proceedings in accordance with 28 USC 636. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/26/07. (ch, )
November 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Answer Due Deadline Updated for Yahoo! Inc. to 12/7/2007. (ch, )
November 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting 37 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Yahoo! Inc. deadline is extended to 12/7/07. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/26/07. (ch, )
November 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 16 Amended Complaint, by Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
November 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 36 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Microsoft Corporation to 12/7/2007. (ch, )
November 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting 32 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Microsoft's deadline to answer Amended Complaint is 12/7/07. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/20/07. (ch, )
November 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Answer Due Deadline Updated for AOL LLC to 12/7/2007. (ehs, )
November 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting 31 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Deadline extended for deft AOL to 12/7/07. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/19/07. (ehs, )
November 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Answer Due Deadline Updated for Google Inc. to 12/7/2007. (ehs, )
November 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting 30 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Deadline extended to 12/7/07 for deft Google to file answer. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/19/07. (ehs, )
November 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint of Plaintiff by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric)
November 16, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time for AOL LLC to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by AOL LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gillam, Harry)
November 16, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to the Amended Complaint for Patent Infringement by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Beck, David)
November 8, 2007 Opinion or Order Answer Due Deadline Updated for A9.com, Inc. to 12/7/2007. (ch, )
November 8, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting 28 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. A9.com, INc. deadline is extended to 12/7/07 . Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/8/07. (ch, )
November 7, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint by Performance Pricing, Inc.. (Cho, Christin) Additional attachment(s)(attached proposed order) added on 11/8/2007 (ch, ). Modified on 11/8/2007 (ch, ).
November 1, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 27 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Performance Pricing, Inc.. A9.com, Inc. served by Process Server on 10/18/2007, answer due 11/7/2007. (ch, )
October 31, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 26 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Rachel Krevans on behalf of Yahoo! Inc. (Krevans, Rachel)
October 24, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 25 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Michael A Jacobs for Yahoo! Inc. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 6-1-11513. (ch, )
October 24, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 24 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Richard S J Hung for Yahoo! Inc. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 6-1-11513. (ch, )
October 23, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting 20 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Yahoo!, Inc. deadline is extended to 11/21/07 . Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/23/07. (ch, )
October 23, 2007 Opinion or Order Answer Due Deadline Updated for AOL LLC to 11/16/2007. (ch, )
October 23, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting 21 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. AOL, LLC deadline is extended to 11/16/07 . Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/23/07. (ch, )
October 22, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint Agreed Motion for Extension of Time for AOL LLC to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Original Complaint by Performance Pricing, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
October 22, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 16 Amended Complaint, [Unopposed] by Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
October 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 19 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Performance Pricing, Inc.. IAC Search & Media, Inc. served Process Server on 10/18/2007, answer due 11/7/2007. (ch, )
October 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Answer Due Deadline Updated for Google Inc. to 11/19/2007. (ch, )
October 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER - granting 13 Stipulation of extension of time to answer. Google's deadline to answer is 11/19/07. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/16/07. (ch, )
October 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting 12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Microsoft deadline is extended to 11/19/07 . Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/16/07. (ch, )
October 16, 2007 Opinion or Order E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to A9.com, Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc.. (ch, )
October 16, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 16 AMENDED COMPLAINT Amended Complaint for Patent Infringement against A9.com, Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Google Inc., AOL LLC, Microsoft Corporation, Yahoo! Inc., filed by Performance Pricing, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Abernathy, Nancy)
October 16, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nancy Claire Abernathy on behalf of Performance Pricing, Inc. (Abernathy, Nancy)
October 16, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Elizabeth L DeRieux on behalf of Performance Pricing, Inc. (DeRieux, Elizabeth)
October 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION re 1 Complaint Stipulation for Extension of Time for Google Inc. to Answer or Otherwise Respond by Performance Pricing, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
October 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint of Plaintiff by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric)
October 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 11 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Performance Pricing, Inc.. Yahoo! Inc. served by Process Server on 9/28/2007, answer due 10/18/2007. (ch, )
October 9, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christin K Cho on behalf of Performance Pricing, Inc. (Cho, Christin)
October 9, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gregory Scott Dovel on behalf of Performance Pricing, Inc. (Dovel, Gregory)
October 2, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing fee: $ 350.00, receipt number 2-1-3064 (ch, )
October 1, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 8 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Performance Pricing, Inc.. AOL LLC served on 9/28/2007, answer due 10/18/2007. (ehs, )
October 1, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 7 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Performance Pricing, Inc.. Microsoft Corporation served on 9/28/2007, answer due 10/18/2007. (ehs, )
October 1, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 6 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Performance Pricing, Inc.. Google Inc. served on 9/28/2007, answer due 10/18/2007. (ehs, )
October 1, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Charles Ainsworth on behalf of Performance Pricing, Inc. (Ainsworth, Charles)
October 1, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert Christopher Bunt on behalf of Performance Pricing, Inc. (Bunt, Robert)
September 27, 2007 Opinion or Order E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Google Inc., AOL LLC, Microsoft Corporation, Yahoo! Inc.. (ch, )
September 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding A Patent or Trademark. (Copy forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office.). (ch, )
September 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Performance Pricing, Inc. identifying NONE as Corporate Parent. (ch, )
September 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 1 ORIGINAL COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Google Inc., AOL LLC, Microsoft Corporation, Yahoo! Inc. (Filing fee $ 350.) , filed by Performance Pricing, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ch, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Performance Pricing, Inc. v. Google Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Performance Pricing, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory Scott Dovel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google Inc.
Represented By: Charles K Verhoeven
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AOL LLC
Represented By: Charles K Verhoeven
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Microsoft Corporation
Represented By: David T Pritikin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yahoo! Inc.
Represented By: Rachel Krevans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A9.com, Inc.
Represented By: Andy Tindel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IAC Search & Media, Inc.
Represented By: Collin Michael Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Yahoo! Inc.
Represented By: Rachel Krevans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Microsoft Corporation
Represented By: Eric Hugh Findlay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: A9.com, Inc.
Represented By: Andy Tindel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: AOL LLC
Represented By: Harry Lee Gillam, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Google Inc.
Represented By: Michael Ernest Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: IAC Search & Media, Inc.
Represented By: Otis W Carroll, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Performance Pricing, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory Scott Dovel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?