IP Innovation, LLC. et al v. Red Hat Inc. et al Featured Case

Plaintiff IP Innovation LLC and Technology Licensing Corporation alleged that defendants Red Hat Inc. and Novell Inc. infringed on U.S. Patent Nos. 5,072,412 entitled "User Interface With Multiple Workspaces for Sharing Display System Objects," 5,533,183 entitled "User Interface With Multiple Workspaces for Sharing Display System Objects," and 5,394,521 entitled "User Interface With Multiple Workspaces for Sharing Display System Objects."

Plaintiff: IP Innovation, LLC. and Technology Licensing Corporation
Defendant: Red Hat Inc. and Novell Inc.
Case Number: 2:2007cv00447
Filed: October 9, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Marshall Office
County: Anderson
Presiding Judge: Leonard Davis
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 270 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 254 MOTION to Redact 242 Transcript,,, 237 Transcript,,, 236 Transcript,,, 235 Transcript,,, 238 Transcript,,, 241 Transcript,,, PLAINTIFFS' SUR-REPLY IN OPPOSITION filed by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation. (Hill, Jack)
July 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 269 REPLY to Response to Motion re 254 MOTION to Redact 242 Transcript,,, 237 Transcript,,, 236 Transcript,,, 235 Transcript,,, 238 Transcript,,, 241 Transcript,,, filed by Novell Inc., Red Hat Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F)(LaValle, Amy)
July 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 268 ORDER granting 265 Motion to Seal Document ORDERED that the clerk remove Exhibits 1-6 to Dkt. No. 264 from the public file and restrict public access to them. Signed by Judge Randall R. Rader on 7/20/2010. (ch, )
July 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 267 ORDER granting 266 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: 264 Response in Opposition to Motion Responses due by 7/23/2010. Signed by Judge Randall R. Rader on 7/20/2010. (ch, )
July 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 266 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 264 Response in Opposition to Motion, by Novell Inc., Red Hat Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(LaValle, Amy)
July 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 265 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document 264 Response in Opposition to Motion, by Novell Inc., Red Hat Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(LaValle, Amy)
July 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 264 RESPONSE in Opposition re 254 MOTION to Redact 242 Transcript,,, 237 Transcript,,, 236 Transcript,,, 235 Transcript,,, 238 Transcript,,, 241 Transcript,,, filed by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack)
July 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 263 ORDER granting 254 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Dft Motion for Redactions of the Trial Transcripts. Deadline is extended to 7/15/2010. Signed by Judge Randall R. Rader on 7/2/2010. (ch, )
July 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 262 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 254 MOTION to Redact 242 Transcript,,, 237 Transcript,,, 236 Transcript,,, 235 Transcript,,, 238 Transcript,,, 241 Transcript,,, by IP Innovation, LLC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack)
June 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 261 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 251 SEALED MOTION Plaintiffs' Motion For Judgment As A Matter Of Law On Infringement And Validity filed by Novell Inc., Red Hat Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(LaValle, Amy)
June 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 260 SEALED Plaintiffs' Sur-Reply To Defendants' Motion For An Order Finding An Exceptional Case And Awarding Attorneys' Fees And Expenses Pursuant To 35 U.S.C. Section 285 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 249 SEALED MOTION for an Order Finding an Exceptional Case and Awarding Attorneys' Fees and Expenses Pursuant to 35 USC 285 filed by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit I)(Gibbons, Paul) Modified on 6/15/2010 (ch, ).
June 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 259 Plaintiffs' Reply In Support Of Their Motion For Judgment As A Matter Of Law On Infringement And Validity Filed Under SealSEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 251 SEALED MOTION Plaintiffs' Motion For Judgment As A Matter Of Law On Infringement And Validity filed by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation. (Gibbons, Paul)
June 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 258 REPLY to Response to Motion re 250 SEALED MOTION Defendants' Rule 50(a) (Pre-Verdict) Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law on the Issues of Infringement (Renewed), Damages (Renewed), and Invalidity SEALED MOTION Defendants' Rule 50(a) (Pre-Verdict) Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law on the Issues of Infringement (Renewed), Damages (Renewed), and Invalidity filed by Novell Inc., Red Hat Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10)(LaValle, Amy)
June 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 257 REPLY to Response to Motion re 249 SEALED MOTION for an Order Finding an Exceptional Case and Awarding Attorneys' Fees and Expenses Pursuant to 35 USC 285 filed by Novell Inc., Red Hat Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(LaValle, Amy)
June 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 256 RESPONSE in Opposition re 248 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Plaintiffs' Renewed Motion For Judgment As A Matter Of Law, Or In The Alternative, For A New Trial filed by Novell Inc., Red Hat Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(LaValle, Amy)
June 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 255 RESPONSE in Opposition re 251 SEALED MOTION Plaintiffs' Motion For Judgment As A Matter Of Law On Infringement And Validity filed by Novell Inc., Red Hat Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Text of Proposed Order)(LaValle, Amy)
June 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 254 MOTION to Redact 242 Transcript,,, 237 Transcript,,, 236 Transcript,,, 235 Transcript,,, 238 Transcript,,, 241 Transcript,,, by Novell Inc., Red Hat Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(LaValle, Amy)
May 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 253 SEALED Plaintiffs' Response To Defendants' Motion For Judgment As A Matter Of Law SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 219 SEALED MOTION Defendants Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law on the Issues of Infringement and Damages, 250 SEALED MOTION Defendants' Rule 50(a) (Pre-Verdict) Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law on the Issues of Infringement (Renewed), Damages (Renewed), and Invalidity SEALED MOTION Defendants' Rule 50(a) (Pre-Verdict) Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law on the Issues of Infringement (Renewed), Damages (Renewed), and Invalidity filed by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - 4/26 PM, # 2 Exhibit A - 4/27 AM, # 3 Exhibit A - 4/27 PM, # 4 Exhibit A - 4/28 PM, # 5 Exhibit A - 4/29 AM, # 6 Exhibit A - 4/29 PM, # 7 Exhibit A - 4/30, # 8 Exhibit B, # 9 Exhibit C, # 10 Exhibit D, # 11 Exhibit E, # 12 Exhibit F, # 13 Exhibit G, # 14 Exhibit H, # 15 Exhibit I, # 16 Exhibit J, # 17 Exhibit K, # 18 Exhibit L, # 19 Exhibit M, # 20 Exhibit N, # 21 Exhibit O, # 22 Exhibit P)(Gibbons, Paul) Modified on 6/1/2010 (sm, ).
May 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 252 SEALED Plaintiffs' Opposition To Defendants' Motion For An Order Finding An Exceptional Case And Awarding Attorneys Fees And Expenses Pursuant To 35 U.S.C. Sec. 285 - SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 249 SEALED MOTION for an Order Finding an Exceptional Case and Awarding Attorneys' Fees and Expenses Pursuant to 35 USC 285 filed by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - 4/27 A.M., # 2 Exhibit A - 4/27 P.M., # 3 Exhibit A - 4/29 P.M., # 4 Exhibit A - 4/30, # 5 Exhibit B, # 6 Exhibit C, # 7 Exhibit D, # 8 Exhibit E, # 9 Exhibit F, # 10 Exhibit G, # 11 Exhibit H)(Gibbons, Paul) Modified on 5/28/2010 (ch, ).
May 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 251 SEALED MOTION Plaintiffs' Motion For Judgment As A Matter Of Law On Infringement And Validity by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - 4/26 PM, # 2 Exhibit A - 4/27 - AM, # 3 Exhibit A - 4/27 - PM, # 4 Exhibit A - 4/28 - AM, # 5 Exhibit A - 4/28 - PM, # 6 Exhibit A - 4/29 - AM, # 7 Exhibit A - 4/29 - PM, # 8 Exhibit A - 4/30 - AM, # 9 Exhibit B, # 10 Exhibit C, # 11 Exhibit D, # 12 Exhibit E, # 13 Exhibit F, # 14 Exhibit G, # 15 Exhibit H)(Gibbons, Paul) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/17/2010: # 16 Text of Proposed Order) (ch, ).
May 17, 2010 Opinion or Order ***FILED IN ERROR. FILED UNDER WRONG EVENT Document # 247, Motion for Judgment as a matter of law. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
May 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 250 SEALED MOTION Defendants' Rule 50(a) (Pre-Verdict) Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law on the Issues of Infringement (Renewed), Damages (Renewed), and Invalidity by Novell Inc., Red Hat Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Text of Proposed Order)(LaValle, Amy)
May 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 249 SEALED MOTION for an Order Finding an Exceptional Case and Awarding Attorneys' Fees and Expenses Pursuant to 35 USC 285 by Novell Inc., Red Hat Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Text of Proposed Order)(LaValle, Amy)
May 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 248 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Plaintiffs' Renewed Motion For Judgment As A Matter Of Law, Or In The Alternative, For A New Trial by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation. Responses due by 5/14/2010 (Gibbons, Paul) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/17/2010: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (ch, ).
May 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 247 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE.***Sealed Document. Plaintiffs' Motion For Judgment As A Matter Of Law On Infringement And Validity Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (4/26 PM), # 2 Exhibit A (4/27 AM), # 3 Exhibit A (4/27 PM), # 4 Exhibit A (4/28 AM), # 5 Exhibit A (4/28 PM), # 6 Exhibit A (4/29 AM), # 7 Exhibit A (4/29 PM), # 8 Exhibit A (4/30 AM), # 9 Exhibit B, # 10 Exhibit C, # 11 Exhibit D, # 12 Exhibit E, # 13 Exhibit F, # 14 Exhibit G, # 15 Exhibit H)(Gibbons, Paul) Modified on 5/17/2010 (ch, ).
May 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 246 PROPOSED BILL OF COSTS filed by Novell Inc., Red Hat Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Agreed Bill of Costs, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit)(LaValle, Amy)
May 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 245 NOTICE by Novell Inc., Red Hat Inc. of Intent to Redact Trial Transcripts (LaValle, Amy)
May 7, 2010 Opinion or Order NOTICE to the Court of receipt of Novell Inc., Red Hat Inc. trial exhibits received in the Clerk's office on 5/7/10 final trial exhibits received in three disc. Exhibits places in the exhibit room first floor(ehs, )
May 7, 2010 Opinion or Order NOTICE to the court of receipt of IP Innovation, LLC. trial exhibits received in the Clerk's office 5/7/10, final exhibits contained on four discs. Exhibits placed in exhibit room first floor (ehs, ) Modified on 5/7/2010 (ehs, ).
May 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 244 NOTICE by Novell Inc., Red Hat Inc. Notice of Service - Defendants' Final Trial Exhibits (LaValle, Amy)
May 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 243 NOTICE by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation re 231 Exhibit List OF SERVICE (Gibbons, Paul)
May 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 242 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 4/30/10 Session before Judge Randall Rader. Court Reporter/Transcriber: S. Simmons/D. Collins/G. Fuller,Telephone number: 903/935-3868. <P>NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov<P> Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 6/1/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/9/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/9/2010. (lss, )
May 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 241 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 4/29/10 Afternoon Session before Judge Randall Rader. Court Reporter/Transcriber: S. Simmons/D. Collins/G. Fuller,Telephone number: 903/935-3868. <P>NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov<P> Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 6/1/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/9/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/9/2010. (lss, )
May 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 240 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 4/29/10 Morning Session before Judge Randall Rader. Court Reporter/Transcriber: S. Simmons/D. Collins/G. Fuller,Telephone number: 903/935-3868. <P>NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov<P> Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 6/1/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/9/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/9/2010. (lss, )
May 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 239 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 4/28/10 Afternoon Session before Judge Randall Rader. Court Reporter/Transcriber: S. Simmons/D. Collins/G. Fuller,Telephone number: 903/935-3868. <P>NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov<P> Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 6/1/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/9/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/9/2010. (lss, )
May 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 238 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 4/28/10 Morning Session before Judge Randall Rader. Court Reporter/Transcriber: S. Simmons/D. Collins/G. Fuller,Telephone number: 903/935-3868. <P>NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov<P> Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 6/1/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/9/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/9/2010. (lss, )
May 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 237 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 4/27/10 Afternoon Session before Judge Randall Rader. Court Reporter/Transcriber: S. Simmons/D. Dollins/G. Fuller,Telephone number: 903/935-3868. <P>NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov<P> Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 6/1/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/9/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/9/2010. (lss, )
May 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 236 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 4/27/10 Morning Session before Judge Randall Rader. Court Reporter/Transcriber: S. Simmons/D. Collins/G. Fuller,Telephone number: 903/935-3868. <P>NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov<P> Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 6/1/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/9/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/9/2010. (lss, )
May 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 235 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 4/26/10 Afternoon Session before Judge Randall Rader. Court Reporter/Transcriber: S. Simmons/D. Collins/G. Fuller,Telephone number: 903/935-3868. <P>NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov<P> Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 6/1/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/9/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/9/2010. (lss, )
May 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 234 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 4/26/10 Voir Dire Proceedings before Judge Randall Rader. Court Reporter/Transcriber: S. Simmons/D. Dollins/G. Fuller,Telephone number: 903/935-3868. <P>NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov<P> Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 6/1/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/9/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/9/2010. (lss, )
May 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 233 Exhibit List Defendants' Final Trial Exhibit List by Novell Inc., Red Hat Inc... (LaValle, Amy)
May 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 232 ORDER Clarifying Final Judgment; judgment of non-infringement and invalidity is hereby entered in favor of Defendants and against Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Randall R. Rader on 5/3/10. (poa, )
May 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 231 Exhibit List PLAINTIFFS' FINAL EXHIBIT LIST by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation.. (Gibbons, Paul)
May 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 230 Exhibit List PLAINTIFFS' SUBMISSION OF TRIAL EXHIBITS ADMITTED APRIL 30, 2010 by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation.. (Gibbons, Paul)
April 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Randall R. Rader: Jury Trial completed on 4/30/2010. Jury verdict. (Court Reporter Donna Collins.) (jml)
April 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 228 Exhibit List Defendants' Submission of Trial Exhibits Admitted April 30, 2010 by Novell Inc., Red Hat Inc... (LaValle, Amy)
April 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 227 FINAL JUDGMENT in favor of Novell Inc., Red Hat Inc. against IP Innovation, LLC.. Signed by Judge Randall R. Rader on 4/30/10. (ehs, )
April 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 226 SEALED Jury Notes. (jml)
April 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 225 JURY VERDICT. (jml)
April 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 223 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Randall R. Rader: Jury Selection held on 4/26/2010; First day of Jury Trial held on 4/26/2010. (Court Reporter Donna Collins.) (shd, )
April 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 222 CLOSING JURY INSTRUCTIONS. Signed by Judge Randall R. Rader on 4/30/2010. (ch, )
April 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Randall R. Rader: Jury Trial held on 4/29/2010. (Court Reporter Donna Collins.) (jml)
April 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 221 Exhibit List PLAINTIFFS' SUBMISSION OF TRIAL EXHIBITS ADMITTED APRIL 29, 2010 by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation.. (Gibbons, Paul)
April 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 220 Exhibit List Defendants Submission of Trial Exhibits Admitted April 29, 2010 by Novell Inc., Red Hat Inc... (LaValle, Amy)
April 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 219 SEALED MOTION Defendants Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law on the Issues of Infringement and Damages by Novell Inc., Red Hat Inc.. (Reiter, Mark) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/30/2010: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (ch, ).
April 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 229 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Randall R. Rader: Third day of Jury Trial held on 4/28/2010. (Court Reporter Donna Collins.) (shd, )
April 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 218 Exhibit List PLAINTIFFS SUBMISSION OF TRIAL EXHIBITS ADMITTED APRIL 28, 2010 by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation.. (Gibbons, Paul)
April 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 217 Exhibit List Defendants Submission of Trial Exhibits Admitted April 28, 2010 by Novell Inc., Red Hat Inc... (LaValle, Amy)
April 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 224 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Randall R. Rader: Second day of Jury Trial held on 4/27/2010. (Court Reporter Donna Collins.) (shd, )
April 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 216 Exhibit List PLAINTIFFS NINTH AMENDED EXHIBIT LIST by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation.. (Gibbons, Paul)
April 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 215 Exhibit List PLAINTIFFS SUBMISSION OF TRIAL EXHIBITS ADMITTED APRIL 27, 2010 by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation.. (Gibbons, Paul)
April 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 214 Exhibit List Defendants Submission of Trial Exhibits Admitted on April 27, 2010 by Novell Inc., Red Hat Inc... (LaValle, Amy)
April 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 213 Proposed Jury Instructions by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Gibbons, Paul)
April 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 212 Exhibit List PLAINTIFFS SUBMISSION OF TRIAL EXHIBITS ADMITTED APRIL 26, 2010 by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation.. (Gibbons, Paul)
April 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 211 Sealed Document. Plaintiffs Bench Memorandum in Support of Allowing Dr. Zimmerman to Testify Regarding Dft's Infringement Through the Use of KDE Workspace Manager. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Gibbons, Paul) Modified on 4/26/2010 (ch, ).
April 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 210 Exhibit List Plaintiffs' Eighth Amended Exhibit List by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation.. (Gibbons, Paul)
April 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 209 RESPONSE to 201 Exhibit List Defendants' Objections to Plaintiffs' Seventh Amended Trial Exhibit List by Novell Inc., Red Hat Inc.. (LaValle, Amy)
April 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 208 Exhibit List Defendants' Sixth Amended Trial Exhibit List by Novell Inc., Red Hat Inc... (LaValle, Amy)
April 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 207 Proposed Jury Instructions by IP Innovation, LLC., Novell Inc., Red Hat Inc., Technology Licensing Corporation. (LaValle, Amy)
April 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 206 RESPONSE to 196 Exhibit List, 186 Exhibit List, 202 Exhibit List, 192 Exhibit List Plaintiffs' Objections To Defendants' Second Amended, Third Amended, Fourth Amended And Fifth Amended Exhibit Lists by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation. (Gibbons, Paul)
April 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 205 RESPONSE to 203 Sealed Document Plaintiffs' Objections to Defendants' First Amended Deposition Designations by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation. (Gibbons, Paul)
April 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORDER - the court enters this order sua sponte. Due to the voluminous exhibits expected to be tendered during the trial on this case the court ORDERS the following here ( see order for details). Signed by Judge Randall R. Rader on 4/23/2010. (ch, )
April 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 203 Sealed Document. Defendants' First Amended Deposition Designations (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(LaValle, Amy)
April 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 202 Exhibit List Defendants' Fifth Amended Exhibit List by Novell Inc., Red Hat Inc... (LaValle, Amy)
April 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 201 Exhibit List Plaintiffs' Seventh Amended Exhibit List by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation.. (Gibbons, Paul)
April 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 200 ORDER granting 197 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Ordered that the parties complete the supplemental damages discovery process by 4/21/2010. Signed by Judge Randall R. Rader on 4/21/2010. (ch, )
April 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 199 RESPONSE to 198 Exhibit List, 195 Exhibit List, 193 Exhibit List Defendants' Objections to Plaintiffs' Fourth, Fifth, and Sixth Amended Exhibit Lists by Novell Inc., Red Hat Inc.. (LaValle, Amy)
April 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 198 Exhibit List Plaintiffs' Sixth Amended Exhibit List by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation.. (Gibbons, Paul)
April 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 197 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (Damages Discovery Deadline) by Novell Inc., Red Hat Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(LaValle, Amy)
April 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 196 Exhibit List Defendants' Fourth Amended Trial Exhibit List by Novell Inc., Red Hat Inc... (LaValle, Amy)
April 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 195 Exhibit List Plaintiffs' Fifth Amended Exhibit List by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation.. (Gibbons, Paul)
April 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 194 NOTICE : The attached jury questionnaire was sent to the potential jury members on Wednesday, April 14, 2010 (ch, )
April 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 193 Exhibit List Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Exhibit List by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation.. (Gibbons, Paul)
April 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 192 Exhibit List Defendants' Third Amended Exhibit List by Novell Inc., Red Hat Inc... (LaValle, Amy)
April 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 191 NOTICE by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation Plaintiffs' Objections to Defendants' Proposed Jury Questionnaire (Gibbons, Paul)
April 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER - the parties are requested to file any objections to the proposed jury questionnaires by 5:00 p.m. (EST), Monday 4/12/2010. Absent objections, the jury questionnaires will be sent to the prospective jury members at the close of business today. Signed by Judge Randall R. Rader on 4/12/2010. (ch, )
April 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 189 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 156 MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' Motion To Strike Defendants' Trial Exhibit List filed by Novell Inc., Red Hat Inc.. (LaValle, Amy)
April 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 188 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Paul K Vickrey for IP Innovation, LLC.,Paul K Vickrey for Technology Licensing Corporation. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-1-5278 (ch, )
April 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 187 RESPONSE in Support re 156 MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' Motion To Strike Defendants' Trial Exhibit List Plaintiffs' Reply In Support Of Their Motion To Strike Defendants' Trial Exhibit List filed by IP Innovation, LLC.. (Gibbons, Paul)
March 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 186 Exhibit List Defendants' Second Amended Exhibit List by Novell Inc., Red Hat Inc... (LaValle, Amy)
March 30, 2010 Opinion or Order ***FILED IN ERROR. NO SIGNATURE PAGE Document # 185, Exhibit List. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
March 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE.***Exhibit List Defendants' Second Amended Exhibit List by Novell Inc., Red Hat Inc... (LaValle, Amy) Modified on 3/30/2010 (ch, ).
March 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 184 RESPONSE to 182 Exhibit List Defendents' Objections to Plaintiffs' Third Amended Exhibit List by Novell Inc., Red Hat Inc.. (LaValle, Amy)
March 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER denying 110 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment on U.S. Patent Nos. 5,072,412, 5,394,521 and 5,533,183 for Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. § 116 and 35 U.S.C. § 102(f) & (g) SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment on U.S. Patent Nos. 5,072,412, 5,394,521 and 5,533,183 for Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. § 116 and 35 U.S.C. § 102(f) & (g) SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment on U.S. Patent Nos. 5,072,412, 5,394,521 and 5,533,183 for Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. § 116 and 35 U.S.C. § 102(f) & (g) filed by Novell Inc., Red Hat Inc.. Signed by Judge Randall R. Rader on 3/29/10. (ehs, )
March 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 182 Exhibit List Plaintiffs' Third Amended Exhibit List by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation.. (Gibbons, Paul)
March 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 181 NOTICE of Disclosure by Novell Inc., Red Hat Inc. of Prior Art Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. 282 (LaValle, Amy)
March 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 180 RESPONSE to Motion re 156 MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' Motion To Strike Defendants' Trial Exhibit List filed by Novell Inc., Red Hat Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(LaValle, Amy)
March 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 179 RESPONSE to 172 Exhibit List Objections to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Exhibit List by Novell Inc., Red Hat Inc.. (LaValle, Amy)
March 16, 2010 Opinion or Order ***FILED IN ERROR, WRONG EVENT, ATTY MUST REFILE. Document # 178, Notice of Disclosure. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (mjc, )
March 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE.***NOTICE of Disclosure by Novell Inc., Red Hat Inc. Objections to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Trial Exhibit List (LaValle, Amy) Modified on 3/16/2010 (mjc, ).
March 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 177 Supplemental MOTION in Limine by Novell Inc., Red Hat Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit F, # 2 Exhibit G, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(LaValle, Amy)
March 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 176 RESPONSE to Motion re 161 SEALED MOTION PLAINTIFFS' MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE CERTAIN ALLEGED REFERENCES AND COMBINATIONS OF ALLEGED REFERENCES filed by Novell Inc., Red Hat Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B - Part 1, # 3 Exhibit B - Part 2, # 4 Exhibit B - Part 3, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Text of Proposed Order)(LaValle, Amy)
March 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 175 RESPONSE to Motion re 160 SEALED MOTION Plaintiffs' Motion In Limine To Exclude Certain Equitable Issues From Being Argued Before The Jury filed by Novell Inc., Red Hat Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(LaValle, Amy)
March 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 174 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 159 SEALED MOTION Plaintiffs' Motion In Limine To Exclude Certain Licenses And Settlement Agreements filed by Novell Inc., Red Hat Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Text of Proposed Order)(LaValle, Amy)
March 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 173 Plaintffs'SEALED Responses to Defendants Red Hat, Inc. and Novell, Inc.'s Motions in Limine SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 162 SEALED MOTION in Limine filed by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J)(Gibbons, Paul) Modified on 3/15/2010 (ch, ).
March 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 172 Exhibit List Plaintiffs' Second Amended Exhibit List by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation.. (Gibbons, Paul)
March 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 171 Additional Attachments to Main Document:(CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE) 162 SEALED MOTION in Limine.. (LaValle, Amy) Modified on 3/12/2010 (ch, ).
March 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 170 Additional Attachments to Main Document:(CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE for 159, 160, 161) 161 SEALED MOTION PLAINTIFFS' MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE CERTAIN ALLEGED REFERENCES AND COMBINATIONS OF ALLEGED REFERENCES, 159 SEALED MOTION Plaintiffs' Motion In Limine To Exclude Certain Licenses And Settlement Agreements, 160 SEALED MOTION Plaintiffs' Motion In Limine To Exclude Certain Equitable Issues From Being Argued Before The Jury.. (Gibbons, Paul) Modified on 3/12/2010 (ch, ).
March 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 169 NOTICE of Disclosure by Red Hat Inc., Novell Inc. Defendants' Pretrial Objections (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(LaValle, Amy)
March 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 168 Exhibit List OBJECTIONS TO DEFENDANTS' FIRST AMENDED EXHIBIT LIST by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation.. (Gibbons, Paul)
March 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER SCHEDULING HEARING ON SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION AND FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE - Hearing on Dft's Motion for Summary Judgment and Final Pretrial Conference following is set for 3/16/2010 10:00 AM @ the US Court of Appeals for Federal Circuit before Judge Randall R. Rader. Signed by Judge Randall R. Rader on 3/11/2010. (ch, )
March 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER granting 147 Sealed Motion for Reconsideration of 1/14/09 order, Denying Dft's Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity for Misjoinder of inventors. The court hereby vacates its January 14th ruling denying Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment as moot and will issue a ruling on the merits of Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Randall R. Rader on 3/11/2010. (ch, )
March 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER denying 115 Sealed Motion to Exclude the Testimony and Strike the Exclude the Testimony and Strike the Expert Report of Myrom Zimmerman on the issue of Infringement and Exhibits. Signed by Judge Randall R. Rader on 3/11/2010. (ch, )
March 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER denying 142 Sealed Motion to Strike the Untimely Supplemental Expert Report of Joseph Gemini. The parties shall complete this process by 4/19/2010. Signed by Judge Randall R. Rader on 3/11/2010. (ch, )
March 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER denying 88 Motion to Strike Supplemental P.R. 3-1 Contentions and Exhibits. Signed by Judge Randall R. Rader on 3/11/2010. (ch, )
March 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 162 SEALED MOTION in Limine by Red Hat Inc., Novell Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Reiter, Mark) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/12/2010: # 6 Text of Proposed Order) (ch, ).
March 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 161 SEALED MOTION PLAINTIFFS' MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE CERTAIN ALLEGED REFERENCES AND COMBINATIONS OF ALLEGED REFERENCES by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H)(Gibbons, Paul) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/11/2010: # 9 Text of Proposed Order) (ch, ).
March 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 160 SEALED MOTION Plaintiffs' Motion In Limine To Exclude Certain Equitable Issues From Being Argued Before The Jury by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Gibbons, Paul) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/11/2010: # 2 Text of Proposed Order) (ch, ).
March 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 159 SEALED MOTION Plaintiffs' Motion In Limine To Exclude Certain Licenses And Settlement Agreements by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J)(Gibbons, Paul) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/11/2010: # 11 Text of Proposed Order) (ch, ).
March 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 158 Exhibit List Plaintiffs' First Amended Exhibit List by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation.. (Gibbons, Paul)
March 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 157 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 147 SEALED MOTION for Reconsideration of January 14, 2009 Order Denying Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity for Misjoinder of Inventors filed by Red Hat Inc., Novell Inc.. (Reiter, Mark)
March 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 156 MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' Motion To Strike Defendants' Trial Exhibit List by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Gibbons, Paul) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/8/2010: # 3 Text of Proposed Order) (ch, ).
March 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER AMENDING DOCKET CONTROL ORDER - Motions due by 3/10/2010., Responses to Motions due 3/12/2010. Jury Selection set for 4/26/2010 09:00AM before Judge Randall R. Rader. in Marshall, Texas., Pretrial Conference set for 3/16/2010 10:00 AM before Judge Randall R. Rader at the US Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit Courtroom 201, Washington District of Columbia. All other deadlines contained in the Docket Control Order remain the same. Signed by Judge Randall R. Rader on 3/5/2010. (ch, )
March 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 114 Sealed Motion to Exclude the Testimony and Strike the Expert Report of Joseph Gemini. Signed by Judge Randall R. Rader on 3/2/2010. (ch, )
March 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 153 SEALED SURREBUTTAL IN OPPOSITION to Motion re 142 SEALED MOTION to Strike the Untimely Supplemental Expert Report of Joseph Gemini filed by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Gibbons, Paul)
February 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 152 NOTICE by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation re 149 Notice of Disclosure Plaintiffs' Objections To Defendants' Deposition Counter-Designations (Gibbons, Paul)
February 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 151 RESPONSE to Motion re 147 SEALED MOTION for Reconsideration of January 14, 2009 Order Denying Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity for Misjoinder of Inventors Plaintiffs' Response To Defendants Motion For Reconsideration filed by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation. (Gibbons, Paul)
February 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 150 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 142 SEALED MOTION to Strike the Untimely Supplemental Expert Report of Joseph Gemini filed by Red Hat Inc., Novell Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(LaValle, Amy)
February 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 149 NOTICE of Disclosure by Red Hat Inc., Novell Inc. Objections and Counter-Designations to Plaintiffs' Opening Deposition Testimony Designations (LaValle, Amy)
February 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 148 NOTICE by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation re 145 Notice of Disclosure Plaintiffs' Objections To Defendants' Deposition Designations (Gibbons, Paul)
February 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 147 SEALED MOTION for Reconsideration of January 14, 2009 Order Denying Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity for Misjoinder of Inventors by Red Hat Inc., Novell Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit (Declaration) of Amy E. LaValle, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit N, # 16 Exhibit O, # 17 Exhibit P, # 18 Exhibit Q, # 19 Exhibit R, # 20 Exhibit S, # 21 Text of Proposed Order)(Reiter, Mark)
February 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 146 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 142 SEALED MOTION to Strike the Untimely Supplemental Expert Report of Joseph Gemini filed by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J)(Gibbons, Paul)
February 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 145 NOTICE of Disclosure by Red Hat Inc., Novell Inc. of Defendants' Exhibit List and Defendants' Deposition Designations (LaValle, Amy)
February 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 144 NOTICE by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation re 138 Agreed MOTION for Leave to File Corrected Proposed Joint Final Pretrial Order Plaintiffs' Opening Deposition Testimony Designations (Gibbons, Paul)
February 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 143 Exhibit List for Plaintiffs by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation.. (Gibbons, Paul)
January 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 142 SEALED MOTION to Strike the Untimely Supplemental Expert Report of Joseph Gemini by Red Hat Inc., Novell Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Text of Proposed Order)(Reiter, Mark)
January 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 141 NOTICE by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation of Request of Daily Transcript of Court Proceedings (Gibbons, Paul)
January 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 140 NOTICE by Red Hat Inc., Novell Inc. Notice of Request of Daily Transcript of Court Preceedings (LaValle, Amy)
January 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 139 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Joseph A Culig for IP Innovation, LLC. and Technology Licensing Corporation. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-1-5156 (ch, )
January 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 138 Agreed MOTION for Leave to File Corrected Proposed Joint Final Pretrial Order by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation, Red Hat Inc., Novell Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, Corrected Joint Final Pretrial Order)(Gibbons, Paul) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/21/2010: # 2 REVISED ORDER) (sm, ).
January 21, 2010 Opinion or Order ***FILED IN ERROR, WRONG EVENT USED, ATTY MUST REFILE USING CORRECT EVENT. Document # 137, Proposed Pretrial Order. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (sm, )
January 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE.***Proposed Pretrial Order Agreed Motion For Leave To File Corrected Proposed Joint Final Pretrial Order by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation, Red Hat Inc., Novell Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, Corrected Joint Final Pretrial Order)(Gibbons, Paul) Modified on 1/21/2010 (sm, ).
January 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER granting 131 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Douglas M Hall terminated as counsel for IP Innovation LLC and Technology Licensing Corporation. Signed by Judge Randall R. Rader on 1/20/2010. (ch, )
January 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 135 Proposed Jury Instructions by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation, Red Hat Inc., Novell Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-1 Plaintiffs' Proposed Final Jury Instructions, # 2 Exhibit A-2, Plaintiffs' Proposed Verdict Form, # 3 Exhibit B-1, Defendants' Proposed Final Jury Instructions, # 4 Exhibit B-2, Defendants' Proposed Verdict Form)(Gibbons, Paul)
January 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 134 Proposed Pretrial Order Joint Final Pretrial Order by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation, Red Hat Inc., Novell Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, Plaintiffs' Trial Witness List, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, Defendants' Trial Witness List)(Gibbons, Paul)
January 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER denying 101 Sealed Motion for Leave to Supplement Their P.R. 3-3 Invalidity Contentions; denying as moot 110 Sealed Motion for Summary Judgment on US Patent Nos. 5,072,412; 5,394,521,; and 5,533,183 for invalidity. Signed by Judge Randall R. Rader on 1/19/2010. (ch, )
January 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 132 NOTICE by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation, Red Hat Inc., Novell Inc. Regarding Pretrial Conference (LaValle, Amy)
January 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 131 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Unopposed Motion To Withdraw Douglas M. Hall As Counsel For IP Innovation LLC And Technology Licensing Corporation by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation. (Gibbons, Paul) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/15/2010: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (ch, ).
January 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 130 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document:(Certificate of Authorization) 128 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion,. (Gibbons, Paul) Modified on 1/13/2010 (ch, ).
January 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ***REPLACES # 126 *** SEALED MOTION Plaintiffs' Surreply In Opposition To Defendants' Motion To Exclude The Testimony And Expert Report Of Dr. Myron Zimmerman by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation. (Gibbons, Paul) Modified on 1/13/2010 (ch, ).
January 13, 2010 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the 126 submitted by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation. NO CERTIFICATE OF AUTHORIZATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL. Correction should be made by one business day. (ch, )
January 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 128 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 114 SEALED MOTION to Exclude the Testimony and Strike the Expert Report of Joseph Gemini filed by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit J, # 2 Exhibit K, # 3 Exhibit L, # 4 Exhibit M, # 5 Exhibit N, # 6 Exhibit O, # 7 Exhibit P, # 8 Exhibit Q, # 9 Exhibit R)(Gibbons, Paul)
January 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 127 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 110 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment on U.S. Patent Nos. 5,072,412, 5,394,521 and 5,533,183 for Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. § 116 and 35 U.S.C. § 102(f) & (g) SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment on U.S. Patent Nos. 5,072,412, 5,394,521 and 5,533,183 for Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. § 116 and 35 U.S.C. § 102(f) & (g) SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment on U.S. Patent Nos. 5,072,412, 5,394,521 and 5,533,183 for Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. § 116 and 35 U.S.C. § 102(f) & (g) filed by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit I, # 2 Exhibit J, # 3 Exhibit K, # 4 Exhibit L (1), # 5 Exhibit L (2), # 6 Exhibit L (3), # 7 Exhibit L (4))(Gibbons, Paul)
January 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT. NO CERTIFICATE OF AUTHORIZATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL. PLEASE IGNORE.***SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 115 SEALED MOTION to Exclude the Testimony and Strike the Expert Report of Myron Zimmerman on the Issue of Infringement filed by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation. (Gibbons, Paul) Modified on 1/13/2010 (ch, ).
January 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 125 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 115 SEALED MOTION to Exclude the Testimony and Strike the Expert Report of Myron Zimmerman on the Issue of Infringement filed by Red Hat Inc., Novell Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Reiter, Mark)
January 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 124 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 110 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment on U.S. Patent Nos. 5,072,412, 5,394,521 and 5,533,183 for Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. § 116 and 35 U.S.C. § 102(f) & (g) filed by Red Hat Inc., Novell Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit (Declaration) of Amy E. LaValle, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7)(Reiter, Mark)
January 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 123 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 114 SEALED MOTION to Exclude the Testimony and Strike the Expert Report of Joseph Gemini filed by Red Hat Inc., Novell Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Reiter, Mark)
December 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 122 NOTICE by IP Innovation, LLC. OF DISIGNATION OF LEAD COUNSEL (Gibbons, Paul)
December 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Judge Randall R. Rader added. Judge Leonard Davis no longer assigned to case. (ehs, )
December 22, 2009 Opinion or Order *** Document # 121, Order corrected to read that the case was transferred to the docket of Judge Randall R Rader and that the case was not transferred to Washington DC..*** (ehs, )
December 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 121 Order TRANSFERRING case from the docket of Judge Leonard Davis to the docket of Randall R Rader
December 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 120 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 114 SEALED MOTION to Exclude the Testimony and Strike the Expert Report of Joseph Gemini filed by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I)(Gibbons, Paul)
December 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 119 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 110 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment on U.S. Patent Nos. 5,072,412, 5,394,521 and 5,533,183 for Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. § 116 and 35 U.S.C. § 102(f) & (g) SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment on U.S. Patent Nos. 5,072,412, 5,394,521 and 5,533,183 for Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. § 116 and 35 U.S.C. § 102(f) & (g) SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment on U.S. Patent Nos. 5,072,412, 5,394,521 and 5,533,183 for Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. § 116 and 35 U.S.C. § 102(f) & (g) filed by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, PART 1, # 7 Exhibit F, PART 2, # 8 Exhibit F, PART 3, # 9 Exhibit F, PART 4, # 10 Exhibit G, # 11 Exhibit H)(Gibbons, Paul)
December 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 118 RESPONSE to Motion re 115 SEALED MOTION to Exclude the Testimony and Strike the Expert Report of Myron Zimmerman on the Issue of Infringement Plaintiffs' Response To Defendants' Motion To Exclude The Testimony And Expert Report Of Dr. Myron Zimmerman filed by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Gibbons, Paul)
November 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 117 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 101 SEALED MOTION for Leave to Supplement P. R. 3-3 Invalidity Contentions Plaintiffs' Surreply In Opposition To Defendants' Motion For Leave To Supplement Their P.R. 3-3 Invalidity Contentions filed by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation. (Gibbons, Paul)
November 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 116 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 101 SEALED MOTION for Leave to Supplement P. R. 3-3 Invalidity Contentions filed by Red Hat Inc., Novell Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(LaValle, Amy)
November 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 115 SEALED MOTION to Exclude the Testimony and Strike the Expert Report of Myron Zimmerman on the Issue of Infringement by Red Hat Inc., Novell Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Text of Proposed Order)(Reiter, Mark)
November 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 114 SEALED MOTION to Exclude the Testimony and Strike the Expert Report of Joseph Gemini by Red Hat Inc., Novell Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T, # 21 Exhibit U, # 22 Exhibit V, # 23 Exhibit W, # 24 Exhibit X, # 25 Exhibit Y, # 26 Text of Proposed Order)(Reiter, Mark)
November 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 113 NOTICE by IP Innovation, LLC. OF SERVICE (Gibbons, Paul)
November 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 112 NOTICE of Disclosure by Red Hat Inc., Novell Inc. (Identification of Rebuttal Trial Witnesses) (LaValle, Amy)
November 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER granting 109 Motion to Seal. Defendants may file their Motion for Summary Judgment and related confidential exhibits under seal. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/17/09. cc:attys 11-17-09 (mll, )
November 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 110 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment on U.S. Patent Nos. 5,072,412, 5,394,521 and 5,533,183 for Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. § 116 and 35 U.S.C. § 102(f) & (g) by Red Hat Inc., Novell Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit (Declaration) of Amy E. LaValle, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Text of Proposed Order)(Reiter, Mark)
November 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 109 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment on U.S. Patent Nos. 5,072,412, 5,394,521 and 5,533,183 for Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. § 116 and 35 U.S.C. § 102(f) & (g) by Red Hat Inc., Novell Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reiter, Mark)
November 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 108 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 101 SEALED MOTION for Leave to Supplement P. R. 3-3 Invalidity Contentions filed by IP Innovation, LLC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Gibbons, Paul)
November 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 107 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Markman and Motion Hearing Proceedings held on 7/28/09 before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter: Shea Sloan, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov. 69 pages. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 11/27/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/7/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/4/2010. (sms, )
November 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 106 NOTICE of Disclosure by Red Hat Inc., Novell Inc. (Identification of Trial Witnesses) (LaValle, Amy)
November 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 105 Trial Witness List by IP Innovation, LLC.. (Hall, Douglas)
November 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 104 NOTICE of Disclosure by Red Hat Inc., Novell Inc. (Service of Rebuttal Expert Reports) (LaValle, Amy)
November 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 103 NOTICE by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation Plaintiffs' Notice Of Service (Gibbons, Paul)
November 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER granting 100 Motion to Seal. Defts may file their Motion for Leave and related confidential exhibits under seal. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/02/09. cc:attys 11-02-09 (mll, )
October 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 101 SEALED MOTION for Leave to Supplement P. R. 3-3 Invalidity Contentions by Red Hat Inc., Novell Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Text of Proposed Order)(Reiter, Mark)
October 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 100 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Defendants' Motion for Leave to Supplement Their P. R. 3-3 Invalidity Contentions by Red Hat Inc., Novell Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reiter, Mark)
October 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 99 NOTICE by Red Hat Inc., Novell Inc. Notice of Service of Expert Report of David A. Wilson, Ph.D. (Reiter, Mark)
October 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 98 NOTICE by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation Notice of Service (Gibbons, Paul)
October 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 97 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jack Wesley Hill on behalf of IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation (Hill, Jack) Modified on 10/20/2009 (ch, ). ( Modified per request from attorney)
September 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 96 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 88 MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' "Supplemental" P. R. 3-1 Infringement Contentions filed by IP Innovation, LLC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Gibbons, Paul)
September 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER granting 93 Motion for Leave to File. Defts may exceed the page limit for their Reply in Support of Motion to Strike Pltfs' Supplemental P.R. 3-1 Infringement Contentions. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/15/09. cc:attys 9-15-09(mll, )
September 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 94 REPLY to Response to Motion re 88 MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' "Supplemental" P. R. 3-1 Infringement Contentions filed by Red Hat Inc., Novell Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit (Declaration of Stephen Gray), # 2 Exhibit A)(Reiter, Mark)
September 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 93 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File (Exceed Page Limit for Reply in Support of Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' "Supplemental" Infringement Contentions) by Red Hat Inc., Novell Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reiter, Mark)
September 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER granting 90 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/10/09. cc:attys 9-10-09 (mll, )
September 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 91 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Hervey Mark Lyon on behalf of Red Hat Inc., Novell Inc. (Lyon, Hervey)
September 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 90 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation, Red Hat Inc., Novell Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reiter, Mark)
September 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 89 RESPONSE to Motion re 88 MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' "Supplemental" P. R. 3-1 Infringement Contentions filed by IP Innovation, LLC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Gibbons, Paul)
August 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 88 MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' "Supplemental" P. R. 3-1 Infringement Contentions by Red Hat Inc., Novell Inc.. Responses due by 9/3/2009 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Text of Proposed Order)(Reiter, Mark)
August 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 87 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 78 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. The Court interprets the claim language in this case as set forth in this Order. The Court's claim interpretations are set forth in Appendix A. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/10/09. cc:attys 8-10-09 (mll, )
July 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER - The Court has received Mr. McLemores invoice for services through July 29, 2009 in the amount of $24,000.00 and hereby ORDERS prompt payment to Mr. McLemore at 10333 Richmond Ave., Suite 1100, Houston, TX 77042 as follows: Plaintiff: $12,000.00 Defendant: $12,000.00 TOTAL: $24,000.00. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 7/30/09. (ehs, )
July 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 86 Minute Entry - 7.28.09 Markman Hrg for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Markman Hearing held on 7/28/2009. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (rlf, )
July 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 84 P.R. 4-5(d) JOINT CLAIM CONSTRUCTION CHART filed by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation, Red Hat Inc., Novell Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Reiter, Mark)
July 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 83 REPLY to Response to Motion re 78 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of Invalidity of U.S. Patent No. 5,072,412 for Indefiniteness Under 35 U.S.C. Section 112 Paragraph 2 filed by Red Hat Inc., Novell Inc.. (Reiter, Mark)
June 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 82 RESPONSE in Opposition re 78 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of Invalidity of U.S. Patent No. 5,072,412 for Indefiniteness Under 35 U.S.C. Section 112 Paragraph 2 filed by IP Innovation, LLC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Gibbons, Paul)
June 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 81 NOTICE by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation, Red Hat Inc., Novell Inc. Joint Notice of Estimated Time for Markman Hearing (LaValle, Amy)
June 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 80 REPLY to 79 Claim Construction Brief, filed by IP Innovation, LLC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit L, # 2 Exhibit M, # 3 Exhibit N, # 4 Exhibit O)(Gibbons, Paul)
June 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 79 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Red Hat Inc., Novell Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J)(Reiter, Mark)
June 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 78 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of Invalidity of U.S. Patent No. 5,072,412 for Indefiniteness Under 35 U.S.C. Section 112 Paragraph 2 by Red Hat Inc., Novell Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit (Declaration) of Amy E. LaValle in Support of Defendants Red Hat, Inc.'s and Novell, Inc.'s Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, # 2 Exhibit A to Declaration - U.S. Patent No. 5,072,412, # 3 Exhibit B to Declaration - Excerpt from the Prosecution History of U.S. Patent No. 5,072,412, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Reiter, Mark)
May 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 77 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit G, # 6 Exhibit H, # 7 Exhibit I, # 8 Exhibit J, # 9 Exhibit K)(Gibbons, Paul)
May 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER denying 75 Joint Motion to Extend Early Mediation Deadline. The court DENIES the motion, but does EXTEND the pre-Markman mediation deadline until 6/15/09.. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 5/1/09. (ch, )
April 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 75 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Joint Motion To Extend Early Mediation Deadline by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gibbons, Paul)
April 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER appointing Michael T McLemore as technical advisor, his costs to be assessed equally between pltf and defts and timely paid as billed. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 4/27/09. (ehs, )
April 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 73 NOTICE by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation, Red Hat Inc., Novell Inc. Joint Notice Regarding Technical Advisor (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(LaValle, Amy)
April 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER granting 71 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Opening Brief due 5/19/09. Response Brief and Summary Judgment motion for Indefiniteness due 6/12/09. Reply Brief and Response to Summary Judgment motion for Indefinieness due 6/30/09 and PR 4-5(d) Chart and Reply to Summary Judgment motion of Indefiniteness due 7/20/09. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 4/24/09. (ehs, )
April 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 71 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (Claim Construction Briefing Deadlines) by Red Hat Inc., IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation, Novell Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reiter, Mark)
April 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 70 NOTICE by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation, Red Hat Inc., Novell Inc. Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Reiter, Mark)
April 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 69 Response ANSWER to 62 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim Plaintiffs' Reply To Red Hat, Inc.'s Amended Answer, Defenses and Counterclaims by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation.(Gibbons, Paul)
April 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 68 Response ANSWER to 63 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim Plaintiff's' Reply to Novell, Inc.'s Amended Answer, Defenses and Counterclaims by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation.(Gibbons, Paul)
April 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Reset Hearings: Markman Hearing set for 7/28/2009 01:30 PM before Judge Leonard Davis. (ch, )
April 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER granting 66 Motion to Continue. Accordingly, the Court will re-set the Markman Hearing in this case for July 28, 2009 at 1:30 p.m.. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 4/8/09. (ch, )
April 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 66 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Markman Hearing by Red Hat Inc., Novell Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit A)(Reiter, Mark)
March 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 65 NOTICE of Disclosure by Red Hat Inc., Novell Inc. of compliance with Patent Rule 4-2 (LaValle, Amy)
March 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 64 NOTICE of Disclosure by Red Hat Inc., Novell Inc. of Defendants' P.R. 3-3 and 3-4 Invalidity Contentions and Accompanying Document Production and Paragraph 2 of Discovery Order Additional Disclosures (LaValle, Amy)
March 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 63 Amended ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, Amended COUNTERCLAIM against all plaintiffs by Novell Inc..(Reiter, Mark)
March 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 62 Amended ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, Amended COUNTERCLAIM against all plaintiffs by Red Hat Inc..(Reiter, Mark)
February 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 61 NOTICE by IP Innovation, LLC. Plaintiffs' Notice of Compliance With Patent Rule 4-1 (Hall, Douglas)
February 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 60 NOTICE of Disclosure by Red Hat Inc., Novell Inc. of Patent Rule 4-1(a) Disclosures (LaValle, Amy)
February 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 59 PROTECTIVE ORDER regarding the confidentiality of discovery materials, Motions terminated: 58 Joint MOTION for Protective Order filed by Novell Inc., Red Hat Inc... Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 2/19/09. (ehs, )
February 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 58 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Red Hat Inc., Novell Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Reiter, Mark)
January 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER granting 56 Motion for Extension of Time for Discovery. All parties deadline to comply with paragraph two of the court's 4/29/08 Discovery Order is 3/6/09 and Dft's deadline to comply with P.R. 3-3 and 3-4 is 3/6/09. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 1/21/09. (ch, )
January 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 56 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Discovery and Patent-Related Disclosures by Red Hat Inc., Novell Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reiter, Mark)
December 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 55 NOTICE of Disclosure by Red Hat Inc. of Initial Disclosures (LaValle, Amy)
December 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 54 NOTICE of Disclosure by Novell Inc. of Initial Disclosures (LaValle, Amy)
December 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 53 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Neema Jalali on behalf of all defendants (Jalali, Neema)
November 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting 51 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Deadlines are set forth herein. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/21/08. (ch, )
November 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 51 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Novell Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(LaValle, Amy)
October 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 50 NOTICE by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation Plaintiffs' Notice Of Compliance With Initial Disclosures Pursuant To The Court's April 29, 2008 Discovery Order (Gibbons, Paul)
October 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 49 NOTICE by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation Plaintiffs' Notice of Compliance With Initial Disclosures Pursuant To Patent Rules 3-1 And 3-2 (Hall, Douglas)
October 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: Jury Selection set for 4/6/2010 09:00AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Jury Trial set for 4/12/2010 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. (NOTE: THIS IS TO CORRECT THE DOCKET ENTRY OF THE DOCKET CONTROL ORDER 40 . (rlf, )
September 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting 47 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Deadlines. Deadlines are set forth herein. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 9/16/08. (ch, )
September 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 47 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by IP Innovation, LLC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Joint Motion to Extend Discovery Deadlines)(Gibbons, Paul)
August 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting 45 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Deadlines are set forth herein. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 8/4/08. (ch, )
August 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 45 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Joint Motion To Extend Discovery Deadlines by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gibbons, Paul)
July 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 44 TRANSCRIPT of Status Conferences held on 4/7/08 before Judges Leonard Davis and John Love. Court Reporter: Shea Sloan, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 8/7/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/18/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/15/2008. 13 pages. See 32 (sms, )
May 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting 42 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Deadlines are set forth herein. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 5/23/08. (ch, )
May 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 42 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Novell Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(LaValle, Amy)
May 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 41 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Amy Elizabeth LaValle on behalf of all defendants (LaValle, Amy)
April 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 40 DOCKET CONTROL ORDER - Amended Pleadings due by 4/23/2009. Discovery due by 4/24/2009.,Exhibit List due by 4/12/2010. Markman Hearing set for 7/9/2009 09:30 AM (TYLER) before Judge Leonard Davis. Motions due by 3/15/2010. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 1/12/2010. Jury Selection set for 4/12/2010 09:00AM (TYLER) before Judge Leonard Davis. Jury Trial set for 4/6/2010 09:00 AM (TYLER) before Judge Leonard Davis. Pretrial Conference set for 3/18/2010 09:00 AM (TYLER) before Judge Leonard Davis. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 4/30/08. (ehs, )
April 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 39 DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 4/29/08. (ch, )
April 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 38 NOTICE by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation, Red Hat Inc., Novell Inc. Notice of Agreement (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A. Discovery Order# 2 Appendix B. Docket Control Order)(Reiter, Mark)
April 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting 36 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Parties shall submit agreed Docket Control and Discovery Orders to the court by 4/28/08.. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 4/22/08. (ch, )
April 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 36 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Modify Date for Submission of Docket Control and Discovery Orders by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation, Red Hat Inc., Novell Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Proposed Order)(Krevitt, Josh)
April 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting 34 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Pltf shall identify the asserted claims that they contend have been infringed, separately for each Defendant, pursuant to P.R. 3-1(a), on or before April 11, 2008. Plaintiffs shall comply with the remaining provisions of P.R. 3-1, as well as with P.R. 3-2, on or before May 30, 2008. Defendants shall comply with P.R. 3-3 and 3-4 on or before July 29, 2008. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 4/11/08. (ehs, )
April 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Motion To Modify Dates For Disclosures And Document Production Pursuant To P.R. 3-1, 3-2, 3-3, And 3-4 by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Gibbons, Paul)
April 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER - in accordance with the status conference held on 4/7/08, this case is set for Markman Hearing set for 7/9/2009 09:30 AM before Judge Leonard Davis., Jury Selection set for 4/6/2010 09:00AM before Judge Leonard Davis., Jury Trial set for 4/12/2010 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis., Pretrial Conference set for 3/18/2010 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. The parties are to submit agreed Docket Control and Discovery Orders to the court by 4/21/08. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 4/9/08. (ch, )
April 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis and Judge John Love : Status Conference held on 4/7/2008. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign-In Sheet) (rlf, )
March 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Status Conference set for 4/7/2008 01:30 PM before Judge Leonard Davis and Magistrate Judge John D. Love in Tyler Courtroom.. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 3/7/08. (ch, )
February 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 30 RESPONSE to 27 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim Plaintiffs' Reply to Red Hat, Inc.'s Counterclaims to Complaint by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation. (Hall, Douglas)
February 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 29 RESPONSE to 26 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim Plaintiffs' Reply To Novell, Inc.'s Counterclaims To Complaint by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation. (Hall, Douglas)
February 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 28 NOTICE by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation re 17 Order, and Request for Scheduling Conference (Ward, Thomas)
February 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against all plaintiffs by Red Hat Inc..(Reiter, Mark)
February 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against all plaintiffs by Novell Inc..(Reiter, Mark)
February 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 25 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Red Hat Inc. identifying T Rowe Price Associates Inc (a subsidiary of the publicly held corporation of T Rowe Price Group Inc) and Legg Mason Inc as Corporate Parents. (Reiter, Mark) Modified on 2/4/2008 (mpv, ).
February 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 24 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Novell Inc. identifying None as Corporate Parent. (Reiter, Mark)
January 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 23 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney David J Mahalek for IP Innovation, LLC. and Technology Licensing Corporation. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 6-1-12496 (ch, )
January 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 22 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Douglas M Hall for IP Innovation, LLC. and Technology Licensing Corporation. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 6-1-12496 (ch, )
January 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 21 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Raymond P Niro for IP Innovation, LLC. and Technology Licensing Corporation. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 6-1-12496 (ch, )
January 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 20 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Arthur A Gasey for IP Innovation, LLC. and Technology Licensing Corporation. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 6-1-12496 (ch, )
January 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 19 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Joseph N Hosteny for IP Innovation, LLC. and Technology Licensing Corporation. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 6-1-12496 (ch, )
January 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 18 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Paul C Gibbons for IP Innovation, LLC. and Technology Licensing Corporation. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 6-1-12496 (ch, )
January 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER - the court orders the plaintiff to file a notice that the case is ready for scheduling conference when all dfts have either answered or filed a motion to transfer or dismiss. The notice shall be filed within five days of the last remaining dft's answer or motion. The notice shall include a list of any pending motions to transfer or dismiss. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 1/10/08. (ch, )
January 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Answer Due Deadline Updated for Red Hat Inc. to 2/1/2008; Novell Inc. to 2/1/2008. (ehs, )
January 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting 13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Deadline for deft Red Hat Inc extended to 2/1/08 to file answer. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 1/7/08. (ehs, )
January 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting 12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Novell Inc has until 2/1/08 to file answer. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 1/7/08. (ehs, )
January 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mark Nolan Reiter on behalf of Novell Inc. (Reiter, Mark)
January 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Move, or Otherwise Respond (Unopposed) by Red Hat Inc.. (Attachments: # 1Proposed Order)(Krevitt, Josh) Modified on 1/7/2008 (mpv, ).
January 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Novell Inc.. (Krevitt, Josh)
November 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Answer Due Deadline Updated for Novell Inc. to 1/7/2008. (ch, )
November 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting 10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Novell's Inc. deadline is extended to 1/7/08. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/27/07. (ch, )
November 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Novell Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Krevitt, Josh)
November 14, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Josh A Krevitt on behalf of Red Hat Inc. (Krevitt, Josh)
November 14, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 8 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation. Novell Inc. served on 11/5/2007, answer due 11/26/2007. (ehs, )
November 9, 2007 Opinion or Order Answer Due Deadline Updated for Red Hat Inc. to 1/7/2008. (ch, )
November 9, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting 6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Red Hat, Inc. eadline is extended to 1/7/08. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/9/07. (ch, )
November 8, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Red Hat Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reiter, Mark)
November 8, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 5 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation. Red Hat Inc. served on 11/5/2007, answer due 11/26/2007. (ehs, )
October 11, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric M. Albritton on behalf of IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation (Albritton, Eric)
October 9, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 3 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Red Hat Inc., Novell Inc.. (ch, )
October 9, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: # 1 Form AO 120)(Ward, Thomas)
October 9, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Red Hat Inc., Novell Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 1290837.), filed by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Civil Cover Sheet # 5 List of Parties)(Ward, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IP Innovation, LLC. et al v. Red Hat Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IP Innovation, LLC.
Represented By: Thomas John Ward, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Technology Licensing Corporation
Represented By: Thomas John Ward, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Red Hat Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novell Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?