PA Advisors, LLC v. Google Inc. et al Featured Case

Plaintiff PA Advisors, LLC allege that Defendants infringed no U.S. Patent No. 6,199,067 entitled "System and Method for Generating Personalized User Profiles and for Utilizing the Generated User Profiles to Perform Adaptive Internet Searches."

Plaintiff: PA Advisors, LLC
Defendant: Google Inc., Facebook, Inc., AgentArts, Inc., 24/7 Real Media, Inc., WPP Group USA, Inc., Seevast Corporation, Yahoo! Inc., Pulse 360, Inc., Specific Media, Inc., ContextWeb, Inc., WPP Group plc, Fast Search & Transfer ASA and Fast Search & Transfer, Inc.
Petitioner: Jonathan Lee Riches
Intervenor Plaintiff: Albert J Pirro
Case Number: 2:2007cv00480
Filed: November 2, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Marshall Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Randall R Rader
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2017 Exhibits Destroyed Per Local Rule 79(b) (sm, )
October 2, 2012 Filing 535 MANDATE of USCA for the Federal Circuit as to #534 Notice of Appeal filed by Jonathan Lee Riches. Appeal is dismissed, each sside shall bear its own costs. Issued as a Mandate on 9/20/12 (ehs, )
June 5, 2012 Appeal Remark re #534 Notice of Appeal : Notice of receipt from the USCA for The Federal Circuit of NOA #534 received on 6/5/12 at 3:50 pm (ehs, )
June 5, 2012 Transmission of Notice of Appeal, Order and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit by separate email. re #534 Notice of Appeal (ehs, )
May 29, 2012 Filing 534 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #226 Order on Motion to Intervene by Jonathan Lee Riches. (ch, )
May 22, 2012 Filing 533 MOTION to Seal Document (Unopposed Motion to Seal Certain Documents Pursuant to the Amended Agreed Protective Order) by Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer) Modified on 5/22/2012 (sm, ).
June 10, 2010 Filing 532 NOTICE from the USCA for the Federal Circuit re #530 Notice of Appeal - PATENT CASE. Case has been assigned 2010-1370 (ehs, )
June 3, 2010 Filing 531 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by PA Advisors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brandt, Todd)
May 21, 2010 Appeal NOTIFICATION re #530 Notice of Appeal - PATENT CASE : Certified copy of the NOA, docket sheet and Order #510 sent to the USCA for the Federal Circuit (ehs, )
May 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 530 NOTICE OF APPEAL - PATENT CASE as to #510 Order on Sealed Motion by PA Advisors, LLC. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 0540-2492847. (Wiley, Elizabeth)
May 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 529 ORDER DENYING ATTORNEYS FEES AND PARTIALLY GRANTING COSTS - (see order for details). Signed by Judge Randall R. Rader on 5/19/2010. (ch, )
May 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 528 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Scott D Sherwin on behalf of Yahoo! Inc. (Sherwin, Scott)
May 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 527 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mansi H. Shah on behalf of Yahoo! Inc. (Shah, Mansi)
May 18, 2010 Opinion or Order NOTICE FROM CLERK - modified document to read REPLY instead of RESPONSE (ch, )
May 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 526 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #492 SEALED MOTION (Defendant Yahoo! Inc.'s Motion to Declare This an Exceptional Case and for Attorneys' Fees and Costs Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. Sec. 285) SEALED MOTION (Defendant Yahoo! Inc.'s Motion to Declare This an Exceptional Case and for Attorneys' Fees and Costs Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. Sec. 285) filed by Yahoo! Inc.. (Reply in Support of Yahoo! Inc.'s Motion to Declare This an Exceptional Case and For Attorneys' Fees and Costs) (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jason White, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Doan, Jennifer)
May 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 525 REPLY to #517 Response to Non-Motion REPLY In Support Of Yahoo! Inc.'s Bill of Costs by Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Second Declaration of Jason White)(Doan, Jennifer) Modified on 5/18/2010 (ch, ).
May 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 524 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #493 SEALED MOTION Google's Motion for Determination of Exceptional Case and Award of Attorneys' Fees, #495 SEALED MOTION for Taxation of Costs by PA Advisors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wiley, Elizabeth)
May 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 523 ORDER granting #520 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Defendant Yahoo! Inc. has until 5/17/2010 to file reply briefs to its bill of costs and its motion for exceptional case, attorneys fees and costs Responses due by 5/17/2010. Signed by Judge Randall R. Rader on 5/11/2010. (ch, )
May 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 522 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #495 SEALED MOTION for Taxation of Costs filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Perlson, David)
May 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 521 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #493 SEALED MOTION Google's Motion for Determination of Exceptional Case and Award of Attorneys' Fees filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Perlson, David)
May 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 520 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Yahoo's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Replies in Support of Bill of Costs and Motion to Declare this an Exceptional Case and for Attorneys' Fees and Costs Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. 285 by Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer)
May 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 519 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #515 Sealed Response to Motion,,,,,. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Liz Wiley, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Wiley, Elizabeth)
May 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 518 Unopposed MOTION To Deem as Timely Filed Plaintiff's Response (Dkt. No. 515), Including Ex. 16 re #515 Sealed Response to Motion,,,,, by PA Advisors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Liz Wiley, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Wiley, Elizabeth)
May 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 517 SEALED RESPONSE by PA Advisors, LLC to #494 Proposed Bill of Costs, (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Alan Brooks, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Wiley, Elizabeth) Modified on 5/5/2010 (sm, ).
May 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 516 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Todd Y Brandt on behalf of PA Advisors, LLC (Brandt, Todd)
May 5, 2010 Opinion or Order ***FILED IN ERROR, WRONG EVENT CODE USED, ATTY MUST REFILE USING CORRECT EVENT. Document # 514, Sealed Response to Motion. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (sm, )
April 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 515 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #492 SEALED MOTION (Defendant Yahoo! Inc.'s Motion to Declare This an Exceptional Case and for Attorneys' Fees and Costs Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. Sec. 285) SEALED MOTION (Defendant Yahoo! Inc.'s Motion to Declare This an Exceptional Case and for Attorneys' Fees and Costs Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. Sec. 285) filed by PA Advisors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Elizabeth A. Wiley, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 10A, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18, #21 Exhibit 19, #22 Exhibit 20, #23 Exhibit 21, #24 Exhibit 22, #25 Exhibit 23, #26 Exhibit 24, #27 Exhibit 25, #28 Exhibit 26, #29 Exhibit 27, #30 Exhibit 28, #31 Exhibit 29, #32 Exhibit 30, #33 Exhibit 31, #34 Exhibit 32, #35 Exhibit 33, #36 Exhibit 34, #37 Exhibit 35, #38 Exhibit 36, #39 Errata 37, #40 Exhibit 38, #41 Affidavit Declaration of David M. Pridham, #42 Affidavit Declaration of Patrick R. Anderson)(Spangler, Andrew)
April 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 514 ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE.***SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #492 SEALED MOTION (Defendant Yahoo! Inc.'s Motion to Declare This an Exceptional Case and for Attorneys' Fees and Costs Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. Sec. 285) SEALED MOTION (Defendant Yahoo! Inc.'s Motion to Declare This an Exceptional Case and for Attorneys' Fees and Costs Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. Sec. 285) filed by PA Advisors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Alan Brooks, #2 Exhibit Google's Bill of Costs, #3 Exhibit Yahoo's Bill of Costs)(Wiley, Elizabeth) Modified on 5/5/2010 (sm, ).
April 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 513 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #495 SEALED MOTION for Taxation of Costs filed by PA Advisors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Alan Brooks, #2 Exhibit Google's Bill of Costs, #3 Exhibit Yahoo's Bill of Costs)(Wiley, Elizabeth)
April 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 512 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #493 SEALED MOTION Google's Motion for Determination of Exceptional Case and Award of Attorneys' Fees filed by PA Advisors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Liz Wiley, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 8a, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18, #21 Exhibit 19, #22 Exhibit 20, #23 Exhibit 21, #24 Exhibit 22, #25 Exhibit 23, #26 Exhibit 24, #27 Exhibit 25, #28 Exhibit 26, #29 Exhibit 27, #30 Exhibit 28, #31 Exhibit 29, #32 Exhibit 30, #33 Exhibit 31, #34 Exhibit 32, #35 Exhibit 33, #36 Affidavit David Pridham, #37 Affidavit Patrick Anderson)(Wiley, Elizabeth)
April 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 511 ORDER granting #509 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Harold Kip Glasscock, Jr terminated as counsel for PA Advisors LLC now known as nXn Tech LLC. Signed by Judge Randall R. Rader on 4/23/10. (ehs, )
April 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 510 ORDER denying #496 Sealed Motion "Rule 59" for new trial and/or motion to alter or amend judgment. Signed by Judge Randall R. Rader on 4/23/10. (ehs, )
April 22, 2010 NOTICE FROM CLERK re #508 Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to Motion. Entry has been modified to show that it is a reply to response, not a surreply. (sm, )
April 22, 2010 Filing 509 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by PA Advisors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Glasscock, Harold)
April 22, 2010 Filing 508 REPLY to Response to Motion re #496 SEALED MOTION (Plaintiff's Rule 59 Motion for New Trial and/or Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment) SEALED MOTION (Plaintiff's Rule 59 Motion for New Trial and/or Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment) filed by PA Advisors, LLC. (Wiley, Elizabeth) Modified on 4/22/2010 (sm, ).
April 22, 2010 ***Modified Document # 487, Motion, Exhibit 2 sealed per attorney.*** (ehs, )
April 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 507 ORDER granting #504 Yahoo! Inc.'s Motion to Supplement the Record of the 3/1/2010 Summary Judgment Hearing. ORDERED that the record of the 3/1/2010 summary judgment hearing is supplemented to include Yahoo! Inc.'s slide presentations. Signed by Judge Randall R. Rader on 4/21/2010. (ch, )
April 20, 2010 Filing 506 Defendants' SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #496 SEALED MOTION (Plaintiff's Rule 59 Motion for New Trial and/or Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment) SEALED MOTION (Plaintiff's Rule 59 Motion for New Trial and/or Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment) filed by Google Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Perlson, David)
April 19, 2010 Filing 505 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #504 Unopposed MOTION to Supplement the Record of the March 1, 2010 Summary Judgment Hearing. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Doan, Jennifer)
April 19, 2010 Filing 504 Unopposed MOTION to Supplement the Record of the March 1, 2010 Summary Judgment Hearing by Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of J. White, #3 Exhibit A - Sealed, #4 Exhibit B- Sealed)(Doan, Jennifer)
April 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 503 ORDER granting #499 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Responses due by 4/30/2010. Signed by Judge Randall R. Rader on 4/19/10. (ehs, )
April 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 502 ORDER granting #498 Sealed Motion to Supplement the Record of the March 1, 2010 Summary Judgment Hearing. Signed by Judge Randall R. Rader on 4/19/10. (ehs, )
April 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 501 ORDER granting #500 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Responses due by 4/30/2010. Signed by Judge Randall R. Rader on 4/19/10. (ehs, )
April 16, 2010 Filing 500 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #494 Proposed Bill of Costs, #492 SEALED MOTION (Defendant Yahoo! Inc.'s Motion to Declare This an Exceptional Case and for Attorneys' Fees and Costs Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. Sec. 285) SEALED MOTION (Defendant Yahoo! Inc.'s Motion to Declare This an Exceptional Case and for Attorneys' Fees and Costs Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. Sec. 285) by PA Advisors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wiley, Elizabeth)
April 16, 2010 Filing 499 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #493 SEALED MOTION Google's Motion for Determination of Exceptional Case and Award of Attorneys' Fees, #495 SEALED MOTION for Taxation of Costs by PA Advisors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wiley, Elizabeth)
April 16, 2010 Filing 498 Unopposed SEALED MOTION to Supplement the Record of the March 1, 2010 Summary Judgment Hearing by Google Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Eugene Novikov, #2 Exhibit A to Affidavit, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
April 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 497 ORDER - Defendants are requested to submit any response to plaintiffs Rule 59 motion by APRIL 20, 2010, AT NOON. Any reply by plaintiff should be submitted by APRIL 22, 2010 AT NOON.. Signed by Judge Randall R. Rader on 4/14/10. (ehs, )
April 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 496 SEALED MOTION (Plaintiff's Rule 59 Motion for New Trial and/or Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment) by PA Advisors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Text of Proposed Order)(Wiley, Elizabeth)
April 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 495 SEALED MOTION for Taxation of Costs by Google Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Brian Cannon, #2 Exhibit A - Bill of Costs, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N-1, #16 Exhibit N-2, #17 Exhibit N-3, #18 Exhibit N-4, #19 Exhibit N-5, #20 Exhibit N-6, #21 Text of Proposed Order)(Cannon, Brian)
April 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 494 PROPOSED BILL OF COSTS filed by Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jason White, #2 Memorandum in Support of Yahoo!'s Bill of Costs, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8)(Doan, Jennifer)
April 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 493 SEALED MOTION Google's Motion for Determination of Exceptional Case and Award of Attorneys' Fees by Google Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17)(Perlson, David) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/5/2010: #18 Text of Proposed Order) (sm, ).
April 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 492 SEALED MOTION (Defendant Yahoo! Inc.'s Motion to Declare This an Exceptional Case and for Attorneys' Fees and Costs Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. Sec. 285) by Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Jason White, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I)(Doan, Jennifer)
March 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 491 ORDER granting #487 Unopposed Motion to Supplement Record of March 1, 2010 Hearing on Dfts Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Randall R. Rader on 3/30/2010. (ch, )
March 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 490 ORDER - granting #470 Motion to Withdraw. Debra Hepburn is terminated as counsel for PA Advisors LLC. Signed by Judge Randall R. Rader on 3/30/2010. (ch, )
March 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 489 ORDER granting #488 Motion for Extension of Time to File Bill of Costs and Motions for Exceptional Case, Attorney Fees and Costs. Deadline for Yahoo! and Google to file their respective Bill of Costs and Motions for Exceptional Case, Attorneys Fees and Costs shall be extended until and including, 4/2/2010. Signed by Judge Randall R. Rader on 3/30/2010. (ch, )
March 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 488 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Bill of Costs and Motions for Exceptional Case, Attorney's Fees and Costs by Google Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer)
March 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 487 Unopposed MOTION to Supplement Record of March 1, 2010 Hearing on Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment by PA Advisors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, # SEALED (2) Exhibit, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Wiley, Elizabeth) Modified on 4/22/2010 to seal Exhibit 2 per attorney (ehs, ).
March 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 486 AMENDED FINAL JUDGMENT -. Signed by Judge Randall R. Rader on 3/16/2010. (ch, )
March 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 485 MOTION to Vacate #484 Judgment Motion to Vacate March 11, 2010 Judgment and Enter Proposed Amended Final Judgment by Google Inc., PA Advisors, LLC, Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Amended Final Judgment)(Perlson, David)
March 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 484 JUDGMENT - order granting defendants summary judgment motion of noninfringement, judgment is hereby ENTERED in favor of defendants and against plaintiff. Signed by Judge Randall R. Rader on 3/11/10. (ehs, )
March 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 483 ORDER granting #355 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting #356 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting #386 Sealed Motion; granting #390 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Randall R. Rader on 3/11/10. (ehs, )
March 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 482 NOTICE by Google Inc., PA Advisors, LLC, Yahoo! Inc. re #481 Order Joint Statement of Remaining Issues (Perlson, David)
March 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 481 ORDER - Parties are requested to submit a joint statement by March 5, 2010 at 5:00 PM, identifying any remaining issues in the case in light of the forthcoming summary judgment order. Signed by Judge Randall R. Rader on 3/3/10. (ehs, )
March 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 480 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #441 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Testimony and Opinions of Dr. V. Thomas Rhyne, #442 SEALED MOTION (Defendant Yahoo! Inc.'s Daubert Motion to Exclude Testimony from Plaintiff's Expert Dr. V. Thomas Rhyne Regarding Infringement) SEALED MOTION (Defendant Yahoo! Inc.'s Daubert Motion to Exclude Testimony from Plaintiff's Expert Dr. V. Thomas Rhyne Regarding Infringement) by PA Advisors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wiley, Elizabeth)
March 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 479 NOTICE by Google Inc., Yahoo! Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Defendants' Proposed Pre-Trial Jury Instructions, #2 Exhibit B - Defendants' Proposed Post-Trial Jury Instructions)(Andrews, John)
March 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 478 NOTICE by PA Advisors, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Post-Trial Jury Instructions, #2 Exhibit B - Proposed Jury Instructions For Use As Pre-Trial Instructions to the Jury, #3 Exhibit C - Proposed Verdict Form)(Wiley, Elizabeth)
March 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 477 Proposed Pretrial Order (Joint Final Pre-Trial Order) by PA Advisors, LLC, Google Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10)(Doan, Jennifer)
March 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 476 SEALED MOTION for Leave to Supplement the Record in Support of nXn's Response to Yahoo's Second Motion for Summary Judgment (Motion for Summary Judgment on Non-Infringement) by PA Advisors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Wiley, Elizabeth)
March 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 475 RESPONSE in Opposition re #471 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Brief in Support of Its Motions for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement filed by PA Advisors, LLC. (Anderson, Patrick)
February 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 474 SEALED MOTION (Yahoo! Inc.'s Motion In Limine No. 6: Motion to Exclude Dr. V. Thomas Rhyne From Offering an Opinion of Infringement as to Claim 1 of the '067 Patent) by Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A)(Doan, Jennifer)
February 26, 2010 Opinion or Order ***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 467, Response. PLEASE IGNORE - REPLACE WITH DOC 469.*** (rml, )
February 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 473 STIPULATION Regarding Google Witness Bahman Rabii by PA Advisors, LLC. (Wiley, Elizabeth)
February 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 472 Sealed Document. Yahoo! Inc.'s Supplemental Brief in Support of Its First and Second Motions for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement (Attachments: #1 White Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Doan, Jennifer)
February 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 471 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Brief in Support of Its Motions for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement by Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer)
February 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 470 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by PA Advisors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hepburn, Debera)
February 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 469 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #396 SEALED PATENT MOTION Motion for Sanction Against Google Based Upon Failure to Produce Relevant Damages Opinion filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Perlson, David)
February 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 468 Fourth SEALED MOTION Google's Motion in Limine No. 4 by Google Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cannon, Brian)
February 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 467 **PLEASE IGNORE - DOCUMENT REPLACED BY #469 ***SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #396 SEALED PATENT MOTION Motion for Sanction Against Google Based Upon Failure to Produce Relevant Damages Opinion filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Perlson, David) Modified on 2/26/2010 (rml, ).
February 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 466 SEALED MOTION to Supplement the Record on Summary Judgment to Include Post-Briefing Admissions by Plaintiff's Technical Expert by Google Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
February 25, 2010 Opinion or Order NOTICE FROM CLERK - clerk modified Document # 463 to be SEALED RESPONSE, per request from attorney (ch, )
February 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 465 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #460 Response in Opposition to Motion,.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B, #2 Exhibit C, #3 Exhibit D, #4 Exhibit E)(Anderson, Patrick)
February 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 464 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #461 Response in Opposition to Motion. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Doan, Jennifer)
February 25, 2010 Opinion or Order NOTICE FROM CLERK - clerk modified Document # 462 to be SEALED RESPONSE per the request from the attorney. (ch, )
February 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 463 SEALED RESPONSE in Opposition re #420 MOTION in Limine (Defendant Yahoo! Inc.'s Motions in Limine) MOTION in Limine (Defendant Yahoo! Inc.'s Motions in Limine) filed by PA Advisors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Patrick Anderson, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Anderson, Patrick) Modified on 2/25/2010 (ch, ).
February 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 462 SEALED RESPONSE in Opposition re #426 Second MOTION in Limine Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 2 filed by PA Advisors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit A)(Wiley, Elizabeth) Modified on 2/25/2010 (ch, ).
February 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 461 RESPONSE in Opposition re #419 MOTION in Limine filed by Google Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Doan, Jennifer)
February 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 460 RESPONSE in Opposition re #420 MOTION in Limine (Defendant Yahoo! Inc.'s Motions in Limine) MOTION in Limine (Defendant Yahoo! Inc.'s Motions in Limine) filed by PA Advisors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit A-1, #3 Exhibit A-2, #4 Exhibit A-3)(Anderson, Patrick)
February 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 459 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #432 Eighth SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 8 filed by PA Advisors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Errata C, #5 Exhibit D)(Wiley, Elizabeth)
February 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 458 RESPONSE in Opposition re #427 Third MOTION in Limine Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 3 filed by PA Advisors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit A)(Wiley, Elizabeth)
February 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 457 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #423 SEALED MOTION Google's Motion in Limine No. 2 filed by PA Advisors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I - 1, #11 Exhibit I - 2, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Errata K, #14 Exhibit L, #15 Exhibit M, #16 Exhibit N, #17 Affidavit)(Wiley, Elizabeth)
February 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 456 RESPONSE in Opposition re #431 Seventh SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 7 filed by PA Advisors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Patrick Anderson, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(Anderson, Patrick)
February 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 455 RESPONSE in Opposition re #430 Sixth SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 6 filed by PA Advisors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Wiley, Elizabeth)
February 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 454 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #424 SEALED MOTION Google's Motion in Limine No. 3 filed by PA Advisors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Wiley, Elizabeth)
February 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 453 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #422 SEALED MOTION Google's Motion in Limine No. 1 filed by PA Advisors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Patrick Anderson, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I)(Anderson, Patrick)
February 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 452 RESPONSE in Opposition re #428 Fourth SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 4 filed by PA Advisors, LLC. (Wiley, Elizabeth)
February 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 451 RESPONSE in Opposition re #435 Fifth SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 5 filed by PA Advisors, LLC. (Wiley, Elizabeth)
February 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 450 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #420 MOTION in Limine (Defendant Yahoo! Inc.'s Motions in Limine) MOTION in Limine (Defendant Yahoo! Inc.'s Motions in Limine) filed by PA Advisors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Wiley, Elizabeth)
February 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 449 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File (Agreed Motion to Extend Time to File Oppositions to Motions in Limine) by Google Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer)
February 25, 2010 Opinion or Order ***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY - ATTORNEY WILL REFILE Document # 448, Reponse. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
February 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 448 ***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY. PLEASE IGNORE.***RESPONSE in Opposition re #420 MOTION in Limine (Defendant Yahoo! Inc.'s Motions in Limine) MOTION in Limine (Defendant Yahoo! Inc.'s Motions in Limine) (Response to Yahoo Inc's Motion in Limine No. 5) filed by PA Advisors, LLC. (Wiley, Elizabeth) Modified on 2/25/2010 (ch, ).
February 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 447 RESPONSE in Opposition re #418 MOTION in Limine and Daubert Motion to Exclude Testimony of Gerald Mossinghoff filed by Google Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
February 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 446 RESPONSE in Opposition re #433 MOTION in Limine and Daubert Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Mr. Stanley Peters filed by Google Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
February 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 445 Submission of Proposed Agreed Docket Control/Scheduling order by PA Advisors, LLC (Joint Request to Correct Docket Control Order). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wiley, Elizabeth)
February 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 444 SEALED ATTACHMENT to Main Document: #420 MOTION in Limine (Defendant Yahoo! Inc.'s Motions in Limine) MOTION in Limine (Defendant Yahoo! Inc.'s Motions in Limine). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 6)(Andrews, John)
February 24, 2010 NOTICE BY CLERK re #420 MOTION in Limine. Clerk has modified this entry to make Exhibit 6 to motion SEALED, per atty. Atty will now refile this exhibit as a sealed attachment for docket purposes.(sm, )
February 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 443 SEALED MOTION (Defendants' Motion to Exclude Testimony and Opinions of Dr. V. Thomas Rhyne Concerning Validity) by Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G)(Doan, Jennifer)
February 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 442 SEALED MOTION (Defendant Yahoo! Inc.'s Daubert Motion to Exclude Testimony from Plaintiff's Expert Dr. V. Thomas Rhyne Regarding Infringement) by Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 White Declaration, #3 Exhibit A to White Declaration, #4 Exhibit B to White Declaration, #5 Exhibit C to White Declaration, #6 Riise Declaration)(Doan, Jennifer)
February 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 441 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Testimony and Opinions of Dr. V. Thomas Rhyne by Google Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Cannon, Brian)
February 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 440 MOTION to Seal Defendants' Motion to Seal and Close the Courtroom During Presentation of Confidential Material at Trial by Google Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Eugene Novikov, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Eugene Novikov, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
February 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 439 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #438 MOTION to Sever (Defendant Yahoo! Inc.'s Motion for Severance and a Separate Trial) MOTION to Sever (Defendant Yahoo! Inc.'s Motion for Severance and a Separate Trial). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B, #2 Exhibit C)(Doan, Jennifer)
February 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 438 MOTION to Sever (Defendant Yahoo! Inc.'s Motion for Severance and a Separate Trial) by Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 White Declaration, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D)(Doan, Jennifer)
February 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 437 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Margaret Pirnie Kammerud for Google Inc.. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-1-5214) (ehs, )
February 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 436 MOTION for Additional Trial Days by Google Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Eugene Novikov, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Affidavit of Jason White, #7 Exhibit 1)(Perlson, David) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/24/2010: #8 Text of Proposed Order) (sm, ).
February 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 435 Fifth SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 5 by Google Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Novikov Decl., #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
February 22, 2010 Opinion or Order ***FILED IN ERROR, WRONG PDF AS MAIN DOCUMENT, ATTY MUST REFILE, THIS MOTION IS NOW TERMINATED. Document # 429, Sealed Fifth Motion in limine. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (sm, )
February 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 434 ORDER granting #416 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order. Deadlines are set forth herein. Signed by Judge Randall R. Rader on 2/22/2010. (ch, )
February 22, 2010 Opinion or Order NOTICE of DEFICIENCY regarding the #417 Motion to seal submitted by Google Inc.. No cert of conference included per local rules. Correction should be made and motion refiled, this motion is now terminated. (sm, )
February 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 433 MOTION in Limine and Daubert Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Mr. Stanley Peters by PA Advisors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B-1, #4 Exhibit B-2, #5 Exhibit B-3, #6 Exhibit B-4, #7 Exhibit B-5, #8 Exhibit B-6, #9 Exhibit B-7, #10 Exhibit B-8, #11 Exhibit B-9, #12 Exhibit B-10, #13 Exhibit B-11, #14 Exhibit B-12, #15 Exhibit B-13, #16 Exhibit C, #17 Text of Proposed Order)(Wiley, Elizabeth)
February 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 432 Eighth SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 8 by Google Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Novikov Decl., #2 Exhibit Novikov Decl. Ex. A, #3 Exhibit Novikov Decl. Ex. B, #4 Exhibit Novikov Decl. Ex.C, #5 Exhibit Novikov Decl. Ex. D, #6 Exhibit Novikov Decl. Ex. E, #7 Exhibit Novikov Decl. Ex. F, #8 Exhibit White Decl., #9 Exhibit White Decl. Ex. 1, #10 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
February 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 431 Seventh SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 7 by Google Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Novikov Decl., #2 Exhibit Novikov Decl. Ex. A, #3 Exhibit Novikov Decl. Ex. B, #4 Exhibit White Decl., #5 Exhibit White Decl. Ex. !, #6 Exhibit White Decl. Ex. 2, #7 Exhibit White Decl. Ex. 3, #8 Exhibit White Decl. Ex. 4, #9 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
February 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 430 Sixth SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 6 by Google Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Novikov Decl., #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
February 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 429 ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE.***Fifth SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 5 by Google Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Novikov Decl., #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David) Modified on 2/22/2010 (sm, ).
February 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 428 Fourth SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 4 by Google Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Novikov Decl., #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
February 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 427 Third MOTION in Limine Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 3 by Google Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Novikov Decl., #2 Exhibit A, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
February 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 426 Second MOTION in Limine Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 2 by Google Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit White Decl., #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
February 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 425 First MOTION in Limine Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 1 by Google Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
February 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 424 SEALED MOTION Google's Motion in Limine No. 3 by Google Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Novikov Decl., #2 Exhibit Ex. A, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
February 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 423 SEALED MOTION Google's Motion in Limine No. 2 by Google Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Novikov Decl., #2 Exhibit Ex. A, #3 Exhibit Ex. B, #4 Exhibit Ex. C, #5 Exhibit Ex. D, #6 Exhibit Ex. E, #7 Exhibit Ex. F, #8 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
February 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 422 SEALED MOTION Google's Motion in Limine No. 1 by Google Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Novikov Dec., #2 Exhibit Ex. A, #3 Exhibit Ex. B, #4 Exhibit Ex. C, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
February 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 421 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #420 MOTION in Limine (Defendant Yahoo! Inc.'s Motions in Limine) MOTION in Limine (Defendant Yahoo! Inc.'s Motions in Limine). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 5)(Doan, Jennifer)
February 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 420 MOTION in Limine (Defendant Yahoo! Inc.'s Motions in Limine) by Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 White Declaration, #3 Exhibit 1 (sealed), #4 Exhibit 2 (sealed), #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5 (sealed), #8 Exhibit 6 (filed unsealed and sealed by clerk per atty)(Doan, Jennifer) Modified on 2/24/2010 (sm, ).
February 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 419 MOTION in Limine by PA Advisors, LLC. (Wiley, Elizabeth) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/22/2010: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (sm, ).
February 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 418 MOTION in Limine and Daubert Motion to Exclude Testimony of Gerald Mossinghoff by PA Advisors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Hoffman, Adam)
February 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 417 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT, PLEASE IGNORE.***MOTION to Seal Defendants' Motion to Seal Documents and Close Courtroom During Presentation of Confidential Material During Trial by Google Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Eugene Novikov, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Eugene Novikov, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David) Modified on 2/22/2010 (sm, ).
February 19, 2010 Opinion or Order ***FILED IN ERROR. FILED UNDER WRONG EVENT. Document # 415, Submission of Proposed Agreed Docket Control Order. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
February 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 416 MOTION to Amend/Correct Joint Request to Amend Docket Control Order by Google Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Perlson, David)
February 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 415 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE.***Submission of Proposed Agreed Docket Control/Scheduling order by Google Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Perlson, David) Modified on 2/19/2010 (ch, ).
February 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 414 Sealed Document - Notice of Errata Re: Google's Reply in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Corrected Reply)(CERTIFICATE OF AUTHORIZATION ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT 1)(Cannon, Brian) Modified on 2/19/2010 (ch, ).
February 18, 2010 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the 413 submitted NO CERTIFICATE OF AUTHORIZATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL. Correction should be made by one business day (ch, )
February 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 413 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT. PLEASE IGNORE.***Sealed Document. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 to Notice of Errata - Corrected Reply)(Cannon, Brian) Modified on 2/18/2010 (ch, ).
February 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 411 ORDER - denying as untimely #395 Request to file a motion for summary judgment of validity re anticipation. Parties are reminded that expert testimony at trial will be limited to the four corners of their expert report. In that vein, dfts proffer regarding anticipation and any corresponding jury instruction may become an issue at a later time. Signed by Judge Randall R. Rader on 2/17/2010. (ch, )
February 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 412 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Eugene Novikov for Google Inc.. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-1-5200(ch, )
February 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 410 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #386 SEALED MOTION Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement filed by Google Inc.. (Cannon, Brian)
February 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 409 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #408 Reply to Response to Motion,. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Riise, #2 Declaration of Zhang)(Andrews, John)
February 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 408 REPLY to Response to Motion re #390 Second MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement filed by Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: #1 White Declaration, #2 Riise Declaration, #3 Zhang Declaration, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2)(Andrews, John)
February 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 407 ORDER - Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/1/2010 02:00 PM in Courtroom 402 before Judge Randall R. Rader at the US Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit. The pending summary judgment motions will be heard first followed by the final pretrial conference. The parties should coordinate with the Federal Circuits IT Department to arrange any presentations or slide shows that will be given. Signed by Judge Randall R. Rader on 2/16/2010. (ch, )
February 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 406 NOTICE by PA Advisors, LLC re #395 Notice (Other) of Compliance (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit A to letter brief, #3 Exhibit B to letter brief)(Fenster, Marc)
February 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 405 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Google's Emergency Motion to Extend the Close of Expert Discovery for Certain Expert Witnesses and the Deadline to File Motions and Objections Related to Plaintiff's Expert Witnesses by Google Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Andrea Pallios Roberts, #2 Exhibit 1 to Roberts Declaration, #3 Exhibit 2 to Roberts Declaration, #4 Exhibit 3 to Roberts Declaration, #5 Exhibit 4 to Roberts Declaration, #6 Exhibit 5 to Roberts Declaration, #7 Exhibit 6 to Roberts Declaration, #8 Exhibit 7 to Roberts Declaration, #9 Exhibit 8 to Roberts Declaration, #10 Exhibit 9 to Roberts Declaration, #11 Exhibit 10 to Roberts Declaration, #12 Affidavit Declaration of David A. Perlson, #13 Exhibit 1 to Perlson Declaration, #14 Exhibit 2 to Perlson Declaration, #15 Exhibit 3 to Perlson Declaration, #16 Exhibit 4 to Perlson Declaration, #17 Exhibit 5 to Perlson Declaration, #18 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
February 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 404 NOTICE by Google Inc., Yahoo! Inc. re #395 Notice (Other) Opposition to Plaintiff's Letter Brief (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Letter Brief)(Cannon, Brian)
February 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 403 RESPONSE to Motion re #398 Opposed MOTION Request for Hearing on Motions for Summary Judgment filed by Google Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Cannon, Brian)
February 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 402 ORDER REQUESTING RESPONSE FROM DFTS RE PLAINTIFFS LETTER SEEKING PERMISSION TO FILE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT - Defendants are requested to submit any response to plaintiffs letter seeking leave to file a motion for summary judgment on validity (Dkt. 395) by 2/15/2010 @ NOON. Any reply by plaintiff should be submitted by 2/16/2010 @ NOON. Signed by Judge Randall R. Rader on 2/11/2010. (ch, )
February 11, 2010 Opinion or Order NOTICE FROM CLERK - Clerk modified Document # 399 to be Sealed per Attorney. (ch, )
February 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 401 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #399 Response in Opposition to Motion. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H)(Giza, Alexander)
February 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 400 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #386 SEALED MOTION Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement filed by PA Advisors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G)(Giza, Alexander)
February 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 399 SEALED RESPONSE in Opposition re #390 Second MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement filed by PA Advisors, LLC. (Giza, Alexander) Modified on 2/11/2010 (ch, ).
February 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 398 Opposed MOTION Request for Hearing on Motions for Summary Judgment by PA Advisors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hoffman, Adam)
February 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 397 ORDER granting #394 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Deadline for Plaintiff nXn Tech, LLC (f/k/a PA Advisors, LLC) (nXn)s oppositions to defendant Google, Inc. (Google) and Yahoo! Inc. (Yahoo)s Motions for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement is extended to 2/10/2010, and the deadline for Yahoo and Googles replies in support of these motions is extended to 2/16/2010. Signed by Judge Randall R. Rader on 2/9/2010. (ch, )
February 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 396 SEALED PATENT MOTION Motion for Sanction Against Google Based Upon Failure to Produce Relevant Damages Opinion by PA Advisors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Motion, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Adam Hoffman in Support of Motion for Sanctions, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A to Declaration, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B to Declaration, #5 Exhibit Exhibit C to Declaration, #6 Exhibit Exhibit D to Declaration, #7 Exhibit Exhibit E to Declaration, #8 Exhibit Exhibit F to Declaration, #9 Exhibit Exhibit G to Declaration, #10 Exhibit Exhibit H to Declaration, #11 Exhibit Exhibit I to Declaration, #12 Exhibit Exhibit J to Declaration, #13 Exhibit Exhibit K to Declaration, #14 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Hoffman, Adam)
February 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 395 NOTICE by PA Advisors, LLC of Compliance with Court's 10/1/09 Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Letter Brief seeking Permission to File MSJ)(Fenster, Marc)
February 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 394 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement by PA Advisors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Hoffman, Adam)
February 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 393 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: (CERTIFICATE OF AUTHORIZATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL) REPLY to Response to Motion re #355 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement Based on Divided Infringement filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(Cannon, Brian) Modified on 2/1/2010 (ch, ).
February 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 392 ORDER granting #350 Sealed Motion for leave to amend their infringement contentions denying #372 Sealed Motion Strike. Signed by Judge Randall R. Rader on 1/29/2010. (ch, )
February 1, 2010 Opinion or Order ***FILED IN ERROR. ORDERS ARE NOT FILED AS SEPARATE DOCUMENT Document # 388, Sealed Additional Attachment. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (CLERK HAS ATTACHED ORDER TO # 386)(ch, )
January 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 391 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #390 Second MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dave Kolm, #2 Declaration of Soren Riise, #3 Declaration of Zachary Zhang, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C)(Doan, Jennifer)
January 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 390 Second MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement by Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Jason White, #3 Sealed Declaration of Zachary Zhang, #4 Sealed Declaration of Soren Riise, #5 Sealed Declaration of Dave Kolm, #6 Exhibit A, #7 Exhibit B Sealed, #8 Exhibit C Sealed)(Doan, Jennifer)
January 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 389 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #355 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement Based on Divided Infringement filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Cannon, Brian)
January 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 388 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE.*** SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #386 SEALED MOTION Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cannon, Brian) Modified on 2/1/2010 (ch, ).
January 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 387 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #386 SEALED MOTION Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 5, #2 Exhibit 6, #3 Exhibit 7, #4 Exhibit 8, #5 Exhibit 9)(Cannon, Brian)
January 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 386 SEALED MOTION Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement by Google Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4 Part 1, #5 Exhibit 4 Part 2, #6 Exhibit 4 Part 3, #7 Exhibit 4 Part 4, #8 Exhibit 4 Part 5, #9 Exhibit 4 Part 6)(Cannon, Brian) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/1/2010: #10 Text of Proposed Order) (ch, ).
January 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 385 REPLY to Response to Motion re #356 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement filed by Yahoo! Inc.. (Doan, Jennifer)
January 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 384 ***REPLACES # 377 ***SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #364 SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion for Sanctions Based Upon Spoliation of Evidence and Untimely Production of Evidence of Payments to Fact Witness filed by PA Advisors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Marc Fenster, #2 Exhibit A to Fenster Declaration, #3 Exhibit B to Fenster Declaration, #4 Exhibit C to Fenster Declaration, #5 Affidavit of Erich Spangenberg, #6 Affidavit of Ilya Geller, #7 Affidavit of Elizabeth Wiley, #8 Exhibit A to Wiley Declaration, #9 Exhibit B to Wiley Declaration, #10 Exhibit C to Wiley Declaration, #11 Exhibit D to Wiley Declaration, #12 Exhibit E to Wiley Declaration, #13 Exhibit F to Wiley Declaration, #14 Exhibit G to Wiley Declaration, #15 Exhibit H to Wiley Declaration, #16 Exhibit I to Wiley Declaration, #17 Exhibit J to Wiley Declaration, #18 Exhibit K to Wiley Declaration)(Wiley, Elizabeth) Modified on 2/1/2010 (ch, ).
January 29, 2010 Opinion or Order ***FILED IN ERROR. FILED UNDER WRONG EVENT Document # 377, Reply to response. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
January 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 383 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File for the Court to Consider Timely Plaintff's Response to Defendant Yahoo! Inc.'s Motion to Strike New Infringement Opinions and Theories in the January 22 Supplemental Expert Report by PA Advisors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wiley, Elizabeth)
January 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 382 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File One and One-Half Pages in Excess on Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Motion for Sanctions and Accept Plaintiff's Exhibits (Dkt No. 379) As Timely Filed by PA Advisors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wiley, Elizabeth)
January 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 381 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #368 Sealed Response to Motion,. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Declaration of V. Thomas Rhyne in Support of nXn Tech, LLC's Response to Motion for Summary Judgment of Yahoo!! Inc.)(Wiley, Elizabeth)
January 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 380 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #366 Sealed Response to Motion, #367 Sealed Additional Attachments to Main Document. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Declaration of V. Thomas Rhyne in Support of nXn Tech, LLC's Response to Motion for Summary Judgment of Google Inc.)(Wiley, Elizabeth)
January 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 379 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #377 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Fenster Declaration, #2 Exhibit B to Fenster Declaration, #3 Exhibit C to Fenster Declaration, #4 Affidavit Declaration of Erich Spangenberg, #5 Affidavit Declaration of Ilya Geller, #6 Affidavit Declaration of Elizabeth Wiley, #7 Exhibit A to Wiley Declaration, #8 Exhibit B to Wiley Declaration, #9 Exhibit C to Wiley Declaration, #10 Exhibit D to Wiley Declaration, #11 Exhibit E to Wiley Declaration, #12 Exhibit F to Wiley Declaration, #13 Exhibit G to Wiley Declaration, #14 Exhibit H to Wiley Declaration, #15 Exhibit I to Wiley Declaration, #16 Exhibit J to Wiley Declaration, #17 Exhibit K to Wiley Declaration)(Wiley, Elizabeth)
January 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 378 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #371 MOTION to Strike New Infringement Opinions and Theories in Dr. Rhyne's January 22 Supplemental Expert Report filed by PA Advisors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Errata A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Errata C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R)(Giza, Alexander)
January 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 377 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE.***SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #364 SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion for Sanctions Based Upon Spoliation of Evidence and Untimely Production of Evidence of Payments to Fact Witness filed by PA Advisors, LLC. (Wiley, Elizabeth) Modified on 1/29/2010 (ch, ).
January 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 376 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #372 SEALED MOTION to Strike New Infringement Opinions and Theories in January 22 Supplemental Expert Report filed by PA Advisors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R)(Giza, Alexander)
January 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 375 ORDER - the video conference currently scheduled for 1/29/2010, @ 2:00 PM is hereby RESCHEDULED, for 1/29/2010, @ 5:00 PM. Both parties should be prepared to discuss dfts motion for sanctions. Signed by Judge Randall R. Rader on 1/27/2010. (ch, )
January 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 374 ORDER Requesting Response from Plaintiff Re Dfts Motion for Sanctions - Plaintiff is requested to submit response to dft's motion for sanctions by 1/28/2010 @ noon. The response should not exceed fifteen pages. Both parties should be prepared to discuss the motion at the video conference set for 1/29/2010. Signed by Judge Randall R. Rader on 1/27/2010. (ch, )
January 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 373 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #371 MOTION to Strike New Infringement Opinions and Theories in Dr. Rhyne's January 22 Supplemental Expert Report. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-A to Declaration of Jason White, #2 Exhibit 1-B to Declaration of Jason White)(Doan, Jennifer)
January 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 372 SEALED MOTION to Strike New Infringement Opinions and Theories in January 22 Supplemental Expert Report by Google Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Cannon, Brian)
January 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 371 MOTION to Strike New Infringement Opinions and Theories in Dr. Rhyne's January 22 Supplemental Expert Report by Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Jason White, #3 Exhibit 1-A to Declaration of Jason White, #4 Exhibit 1-B to Declaration of Jason White, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3)(Doan, Jennifer)
January 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 370 NOTICE OF JOINDER by Yahoo! Inc. re #364 SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion for Sanctions Based Upon Spoliation of Evidence and Untimely Production of Evidence of Payments to Fact Witness (Notice of Joinder by Yahoo!, Inc. in Defendants' Motion for Sanctions Based Upon Spoliation of Evidence and Untimely Production of Evidence of Payments to Fact Witness) (Doan, Jennifer) Modified on 1/27/2010 (sm, ).
January 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 369 Unopposed MOTION Motion for Leave to Consider as Timely Filed Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to Google Inc's Motion for Summary Judgmemt re #366 Sealed Response to Motion, #367 Sealed Additional Attachments to Main Document by PA Advisors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wiley, Elizabeth)
January 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 368 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #356 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement filed by PA Advisors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H)(Wiley, Elizabeth)
January 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 367 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document (Exhibit J is in main document): #366 Sealed Response to Motion,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit K, #2 Exhibit L, #3 Exhibit M, #4 Exhibit N)(Wiley, Elizabeth) Modified on 1/26/2010 (sm, ).
January 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 366 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #355 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement Based on Divided Infringement filed by PA Advisors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I)(Wiley, Elizabeth)
January 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 365 ORDER CONTINUING DEADLINE TO FILE REBUTTAL EXPERT TESTMONY AND SETTING VIDEO CONFERENCE DATE - The deadline for disclosure of rebuttal expert testimony is hereby continued to 2/1/2010. A video conference will be held on, 1/29/2010, @ 2:00 pm, to discuss the parties pending dispute over plaintiffs recently-served expert reports. Any motion to strike should be filed by 1/26/2010, and any opposition thereto by 1/28/2010, @ noon. Both filings should not exceed ten pages. The parties are requested as with all submissions to the court to submit courtesy copies. The parties are also reminded of their duty to meet and confer before approaching the court with any alleged dispute. The court is dismayed by the parties apparent lack of communication given both counsels extensive experience. Signed by Judge Randall R. Rader on 1/25/2010. (ch, )
January 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 364 SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion for Sanctions Based Upon Spoliation of Evidence and Untimely Production of Evidence of Payments to Fact Witness by Google Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Text of Proposed Order)(Gillam, Harry)
January 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 363 REPLY to Response to Motion re #350 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE filed by PA Advisors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit A)(Wiley, Elizabeth) Modified on 1/22/2010 to correct Errata to Exhibit (ehs, ).
January 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 362 REPLY to Response to Motion re #350 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE filed by PA Advisors, LLC. (Wiley, Elizabeth)
January 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 361 Agreed MOTION that March 1, 2010 Final Pre-Trial Conference Occur in Washington, D.C. by PA Advisors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wiley, Elizabeth)
January 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 360 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #359 Response in Opposition to Motion. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B Part 1 of 2, #2 Exhibit B Part 2 of 2)(Doan, Jennifer)
January 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 359 RESPONSE in Opposition re #350 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE filed by Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Doan, Jennifer)
January 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 358 RESPONSE in Opposition re #350 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE Google's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave filed by Google Inc.. (Gillam, Harry)
January 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 357 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #356 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit E)(Doan, Jennifer)
January 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 356 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement by Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E)(Doan, Jennifer)
January 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 355 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement Based on Divided Infringement by Google Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Text of Proposed Order )(Gillam, Harry)
January 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 354 ***DUPLICATE ORDER SEE # 353 ***ORDER - Defendants are requested to submit any response to plaintiffs motion for leave to amend infringement contentions by Wed. 1/20/2010 @ noon. Any reply should be filed by Friday, 1/22/2010, @ noon. Signed by Judge Randall R. Rader on 1/15/2010. (ch, ) Modified on 1/15/2010 (ch, ).
January 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 353 ORDER - Dfts are requested to submit any response to plaintiffs motion for leave to amend infringement contentions by Wed. 1/20/2010 @ noon. Any reply should be filed by Friday 1/22/2010 @ noon.. Signed by Judge Randall R. Rader on 1/15/2010. (ch, )
January 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 352 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #350 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE Exhibit K filed by PA Advisors LLC. (ch, )
January 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 351 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document (Exhibit L is main document): #350 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wiley, Elizabeth) Modified on 1/12/2010 (sm, ).
January 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 350 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE by PA Advisors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J)(Wiley, Elizabeth)
January 8, 2010 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Hearing: Hot-Line hearing scheduled for 1/8/2010 at 4:00 p.m. before Judge Giblin is CANCELLED. The court was contacted an advised that a hearing was no longer necessary at this time. (sal)
January 8, 2010 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Hearing: Hot-Line Hearing set for 1/8/2010 at 4:00 PM in Ctrm 5 (Beaumont) before Magistrate Judge Keith F. Giblin. (sal)
January 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 349 REPLY to Response to Motion re #325 SEALED MOTION Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Amended Disclosure of Asserted Claims and Infringement Contentions and Compel A Complete Answer to Google Interrogatories Nos. 1 and 2 Reply In Support of Google Inc.'s Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Amended Disclosure of Asserted Claims and Infringement Contentions and Compel a Complete Answer to Google Interrogatories Nos. 1 and 2 filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Gillam, Harry)
January 6, 2010 Opinion or Order ***FILED IN ERROR, WRONG EVENT USED, ATTY MUST REFILE. Document # 348, Response in Support. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (sm, )
January 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 348 ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE.***RESPONSE in Support re #325 SEALED MOTION Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Amended Disclosure of Asserted Claims and Infringement Contentions and Compel A Complete Answer to Google Interrogatories Nos. 1 and 2 Reply in Support of Google Inc.'s Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Amended Disclosure of Asserted Claims and Infringement Contentions and Compel a Complete Answer to Google Interrogatories Nos. 1 and 2 filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Gillam, Harry) Modified on 1/6/2010 (sm, ).
December 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 347 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #325 SEALED MOTION Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Amended Disclosure of Asserted Claims and Infringement Contentions and Compel A Complete Answer to Google Interrogatories Nos. 1 and 2 filed by PA Advisors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G)(Wiley, Elizabeth)
December 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 346 Sealed Document. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(Wiley, Elizabeth)
December 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 345 NOTICE by PA Advisors, LLC re #339 Emergency SEALED MOTION to Compel Yahoo!, Inc. to Produce Complete Source Code and Certain Related Financial Information from Plaintiff's Third Set of Interrogatories to Defendants and Emergeny Motion for Extension of Expert Report Deadlines (PA's Notice Regarding Mootness of Motion Seeking Emergency, Expedited Relief as to Yahoo!, Inc. Concerning Extension of PA's Deadline to Serve Expert Reports and Withdrawing Motion to Compel Concerning Financial Information Tied to Content Match) (Wiley, Elizabeth)
December 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 344 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alan Wayne Brooks on behalf of PA Advisors, LLC (Brooks, Alan)
December 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 343 SEALED MOTION to Compel Discovery by Google Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Eugene Novikov, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Text of Proposed Order)(Cannon, Brian)
December 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 342 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (to Extend Deadlines and Agreement on Time Allowed to Respond to Daubert Motions) by PA Advisors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hepburn, Debera)
December 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 341 NOTICE by PA Advisors, LLC re #340 Sealed Additional Attachments to Main Document, #339 Emergency SEALED MOTION to Compel Yahoo!, Inc. to Produce Complete Source Code and Certain Related Financial Information from Plaintiff's Third Set of Interrogatories to Defendants and Emergeny Motion for Extension of Expert Report Deadlines (Wiley, Elizabeth)
December 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 340 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #339 Emergency SEALED MOTION to Compel Yahoo!, Inc. to Produce Complete Source Code and Certain Related Financial Information from Plaintiff's Third Set of Interrogatories to Defendants and Emergeny Motion for Extension of Expert Report Deadlines. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit R, #2 Exhibit S, #3 Exhibit T, #4 Errata U, #5 Exhibit V, #6 Exhibit W, #7 Exhibit X, #8 Text of Proposed Order)(Wiley, Elizabeth)
December 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 339 Emergency SEALED MOTION to Compel Yahoo!, Inc. to Produce Complete Source Code and Certain Related Financial Information from Plaintiff's Third Set of Interrogatories to Defendants and Emergeny Motion for Extension of Expert Report Deadlines by PA Advisors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P)(Wiley, Elizabeth)
December 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 338 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alexander Chester Giza on behalf of PA Advisors, LLC (Giza, Alexander)
December 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 337 NOTICE by PA Advisors, LLC re #336 Emergency SEALED MOTION to Compel Google, Inc. to Produce Complete Source Code and Product Documents Concerning Applied Semantics, Inc. and Kaltix Corporation and Emergency Motion for Extension of Expert Report Deadlines (Wiley, Elizabeth)
December 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 336 Emergency SEALED MOTION to Compel Google, Inc. to Produce Complete Source Code and Product Documents Concerning Applied Semantics, Inc. and Kaltix Corporation and Emergency Motion for Extension of Expert Report Deadlines by PA Advisors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Errata L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Errata O, #17 Errata P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Errata R, #20 Errata S, #21 Exhibit T, #22 Exhibit U, #23 Exhibit V, #24 Exhibit W, #25 Text of Proposed Order)(Wiley, Elizabeth)
December 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 335 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Randall R. Rader Judge David Folsom no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 12/18/09. (mrm, )
December 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 334 Agreed MOTION Defendants' Agreed Motion for Leave to Amend Their Invalidity Contentions by Google Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer)
December 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 333 ORDER denying #295 Motion for Protective Order for reasons set forth at the 11/23/09 hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 12/16/09. (ch, )
December 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 332 NOTICE by Google Inc. Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (Beck, David)
December 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 331 ANSWER to #312 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim of Google by PA Advisors, LLC.(Bustamante, John)
December 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 330 ORDER granting #314 Notice (letter brief requesting permission to file a motion for summary judgment.) filed by Google Inc., granting #297 Notice (letter brief requesting permission to file a motion for summary judgment) filed by Yahoo! Inc.,. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 12/14/09. (mrm, )
December 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 329 ORDER, granting #328 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Unopposed Motion to Allow David J. Beck and Michael E. Richardson to Withdraw as Counsel of Record for Defendant Google Inc. filed by Google Inc.., Attorney David J Beck and Michael Ernest Richardson terminated.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 12/14/09. (mrm, )
December 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 328 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Unopposed Motion to Allow David J. Beck and Michael E. Richardson to Withdraw as Counsel of Record for Defendant Google Inc. by Google Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Beck, David)
December 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 327 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #326 Notice (Other). (Verhoeven, Charles)
December 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 326 NOTICE by Google Inc. re #314 Notice (Other) Notice of Compliance Regarding Court's Motion Practice Order (Verhoeven, Charles)
December 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 325 SEALED MOTION Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Amended Disclosure of Asserted Claims and Infringement Contentions and Compel A Complete Answer to Google Interrogatories Nos. 1 and 2 by Google Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5a, #7 Exhibit 5b, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Text of Proposed Order)(Gillam, Harry)
December 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 324 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Harry Lee Gillam, Jr on behalf of Google Inc. (Gillam, Harry)
December 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 323 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melissa Richards Smith on behalf of Google Inc. (Smith, Melissa)
December 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 322 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Harold Kip Glasscock, Jr on behalf of PA Advisors, LLC (Glasscock, Harold)
December 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 321 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Elizabeth Stoebner Wiley on behalf of PA Advisors, LLC (Wiley, Elizabeth)
December 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 320 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Adam S Hoffman on behalf of PA Advisors, LLC (Hoffman, Adam)
December 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 319 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Adam S Hoffman for PA Advisors, LLC. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-1-5062 (ch, )
December 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 318 Notice of Compliance with Court's Motion Practice Order - Sealed Document. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - letter to Judge David Folsom(Spangler, Andrew)
November 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 317 ORDER, granting #316 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Michael E. Jones, John F. Bufe, Allen F. Gardner and the Potter Minton, P.C. law firm as counsel filed by Yahoo! Inc.., Attorney Michael E Jones; John Frederick Bufe and Allen Franklin Gardner terminated.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 11/24/09. (mrm, )
November 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 316 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Michael E. Jones, John F. Bufe, Allen F. Gardner and the Potter Minton, P.C. law firm as counsel by Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
November 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 315 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #314 Notice (Other). (Verhoeven, Charles)
November 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 314 NOTICE by Google Inc. Notice of Compliance With Court's Motion Practice Order (Verhoeven, Charles)
November 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 313 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Alison E Monahan for Google Inc. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-1-5041. (ch, )
November 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 312 Google's Second Amended ANSWER to #187 Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against PA Advisors, LLC by Google Inc..(Cannon, Brian)
November 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 311 ORDER granting #310 Motion to Leave to File Second Amended Answer toSecond Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 11/19/09. (Please file your Second Amended Answer as per local rule 7(k) "...motions for leave to file a document must be accompanied by the document sought to be filed. The motion and the document should be filed separately.") (mrm, )
November 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 310 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct #242 Answer to Amended Complaint by Google Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cannon, Brian)
November 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 309 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Scott Andrews on behalf of Yahoo! Inc. (Andrews, John)
November 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 308 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joshua Reed Thane on behalf of Yahoo! Inc. (Thane, Joshua)
November 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 307 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jennifer Haltom Doan on behalf of Yahoo! Inc. (Doan, Jennifer)
November 17, 2009 Opinion or Order ***FILED IN ERROR, WRONG EVENT USED, THESE MOTIONS ARE NOW TERMINATED AND ATTY MUST REFILE USING CORRECT EVENTS. Document # 305 and #306, Sealed Motions for notice of compliance. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (sm, )
November 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 306 ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE.***Amended SEALED MOTION Amended Notice of Compliance With Court's Motion Practice Order by Google Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Verhoeven, Charles) Modified on 11/17/2009 (sm, ).
November 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 305 ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE.***SEALED MOTION Notice of Compliance With Court's Motion Practice Order by Google Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Verhoeven, Charles) Modified on 11/17/2009 (sm, ).
November 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 304 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #295 MOTION for Protective Order Modification filed by PA Advisors, LLC. (Weiss, Andrew)
November 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 303 REPLY to Response to Motion re #295 MOTION for Protective Order Modification filed by Yahoo! Inc.. (White, Jason)
November 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 302 ORDER REFERRING MOTION to the Honorable Charles Everingham IV for decision: #295 MOTION for Protective Order Modification filed by Yahoo! Inc.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 11/13/09. (mrm, )
November 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 301 NOTICE by Google Inc., Yahoo! Inc. of Compliance (submission of Preliminary Unenforceability Contentions) (Beck, David)
November 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 300 AGREED AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER, ( Amended Pleadings due by 11/18/2009., Discovery due by 12/21/2009., Joinder of Parties due by 11/18/2009., Markman Hearing set for 9/17/2009 09:00 AM before Judge David Folsom., Proposed Pretrial Order due by 2/1/2010., Jury Selection set for 3/2/2010 09:00AM before Judge David Folsom., Pretrial Conference set for 3/1/2010 09:00 AM before Judge David Folsom.), Motions terminated: #296 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct #186 Scheduling Order, filed by Google Inc... Signed by Judge David Folsom on 11/9/09. (ehs, )
November 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 299 NOTICE by PA Advisors, LLC re #298 Response to Motion, of Emergency Request for Hearing, If A Hearing Is Necessary (Weiss, Andrew)
November 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 298 RESPONSE to Motion re #295 MOTION for Protective Order Modification filed by PA Advisors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Andrew D. Weiss, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H)(Weiss, Andrew)
November 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 297 NOTICE by Yahoo! Inc. re #283 Order , NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH COURTS MOTION PRACTICE ORDER (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(White, Jason)
November 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 296 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct #186 Scheduling Order, by Google Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Cannon, Brian)
November 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 295 MOTION for Protective Order Modification by Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Pleading requesting leave (motion) #2 Affidavit, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(White, Jason) Modified on 11/4/2009 (sm, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/4/2009: #6 Revised Order) (sm, ). Modified on 11/13/2009 (mrm, ). *Referred to Judge Everingham*
November 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 294 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Interrogatory by Google Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(Cannon, Brian)
November 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 293 ORDER granting #292 Motion for Extension of Time to File final infringement contentions. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 11/2/2009. (sm, )
October 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 292 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Serve Final Infringement Contentions Against Defendant Yahoo by PA Advisors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time)(Bustamante, John)
October 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 291 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William C Rooklidge on behalf of Yahoo! Inc. (Rooklidge, William)
October 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 290 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrew D Weiss on behalf of PA Advisors, LLC (Weiss, Andrew)
October 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 289 ORDER granting #287 Motion for Extension of Time to File letter briefs seeking permission to file motions for summary judgment shall be November 4, 2009.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 10/19/09. (mrm, )
October 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 288 ORDER, granting #286 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Ari Rafilson) filed by PA Advisors, LLC., Attorney Ari Benjamin Rafilson terminated.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 10/19/09. (mrm, )
October 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 287 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Letter Briefs Seeking Permission to File Motions for Summary Judgment by Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(White, Jason)
October 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 286 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Ari Rafilson) by PA Advisors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Rafilson, Ari)
October 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 285 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Debera Wells Hepburn on behalf of PA Advisors, LLC (Hepburn, Debera)
October 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 284 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #257 Motion to Quash and for Protective Order. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 10/8/09. (mrm, )
October 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 283 AMENDED ORDER re: motion practice. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 10/1/09. (mrm, )
October 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 282 NOTICE of Designation of Attorney in Charge to David A Perlson on behalf of Google Inc. (Perlson, David)
September 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 281 NOTICE by PA Advisors, LLC re #279 Notice (Other) (PA Advisors' Response to Google's Notice of Supplemental Authority) (Rafilson, Ari)
September 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 280 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 9/30/09. (mrm, )
September 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 279 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority by Google Inc. re #257 MOTION to Quash and MOTION for Protective Order to Preclude Deposition of Johanna Shelton (Attachments: #1 Order)(Cannon, Brian) Modified on 9/30/2009 (sm, ).
September 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 278 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on September 17, 2009, Claim Construction Hearing, 83 pages, before The Honorable Chief Judge David Folsom. Court Reporter: Libby Crawford, CSR, Telephone number: 903.794.4067 Ext. 237 or lcrawford@cableone.net. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through the Court Reporter or PACER. Redaction Request due 10/20/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/30/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/28/2009. (aec, )
September 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 277 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #257 MOTION to Quash and MOTION for Protective Order to Preclude Deposition of Johanna Shelton filed by PA Advisors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Sur-Reply ISO Oppn to Mot to Quash re Shelton)(Bustamante, John)
September 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 276 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Charles K Verhoeven for Google Inc. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-1-4932. (ch, )
September 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 275 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge David Folsom: Markman Hearing held on 9/17/2009. (Court Reporter Libby Crawford.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Cts Preliminary Claim Construction) (mrm, )
September 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 274 ORDER, (Markman Hearing set for 9/17/2009 09:00 AM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before Judge David Folsom.) The Court will not conduct a prehearing conference or technical tutorial on September 16, 2009.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 9/15/09. (mrm, )
September 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 273 REPLY to Response to Motion re #257 MOTION to Quash and MOTION for Protective Order to Preclude Deposition of Johanna Shelton filed by Google Inc.. (Cannon, Brian)
September 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 272 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION CHART filed by PA Advisors, LLC, Google Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Cannon, Brian)
September 10, 2009 Opinion or Order NOTICE of DEFICIENCY regarding the #271 Joint Claim Construction Chart submitted by PA Advisors, LLC, Google Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. No attys signature on pleading. Correction should be made by 1 business day and refiled. (sm, )
September 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 271 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT, PLEASE IGNORE.***CLAIM CONSTRUCTION CHART filed by PA Advisors, LLC, Google Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Cannon, Brian) Modified on 9/10/2009 (sm, ).
September 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 270 ORDER granting #269 Motion for Extension of Time to Comply with PR 4-5 through September 9, 2009.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 9/9/2009. (sm, )
September 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 269 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File PR 4-5(d) Joint Claim Construction Chart by PA Advisors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Thompson, Stanley)
September 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 268 RESPONSE to Motion re #265 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply Brief on Claim Construction filed by PA Advisors, LLC. (Fenster, Marc)
September 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 267 ORDER granting #265 Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply Brief on Claim Construction. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 9/3/09. (mrm, )
September 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 266 DEFENDANTS' SUR-REPLY BRIEF to #248 Claim Construction Brief filed by Google Inc.. (Cannon, Brian)
September 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 265 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply Brief on Claim Construction by Google Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cannon, Brian)
September 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 264 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #257 MOTION to Quash and MOTION for Protective Order to Preclude Deposition of Johanna Shelton filed by PA Advisors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Denying Motion to Quash and Protective Order re Johanna Shelton, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Opposition to Motion to Quash and Protective Order re Deposition of Shelton, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B to Opposition to Motion to Quash and Protective Order re Shelton, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C to Opposition to Quash and Protective Order re Shelton, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D to Opposition to Motion for Quash and Protective Order re Shelton)(Bustamante, John)
August 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 263 ORDER granting as modified #250 Sealed Motion to Quash and for Protective Order to Preclude Deposition of its Co-Founder and President. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 8/28/09. (mrm, )
August 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 262 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document (Cert of Authority to seal): #261 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion. (Cannon, Brian) Modified on 8/26/2009 (sm, ).
August 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 261 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #250 SEALED MOTION TO QUASH AND FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Cannon, Brian)
August 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 260 ORDER granting #259 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #250 SEALED MOTION TO QUASH AND FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER Reply Brief due by 8/25/2009.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 8/25/09. (mrm, )
August 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 259 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #250 SEALED MOTION TO QUASH AND FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER by Google Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cannon, Brian)
August 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 258 REPLY BRIEF REGARDING CLAIM CONSTRUCTION filed by PA Advisors, LLC. (Fenster, Marc)
August 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 257 MOTION to Quash and, MOTION for Protective Order to Preclude Deposition of Johanna Shelton by Google Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Brian Cannon, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Brian Cannon, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Brian Cannon, #4 Exhibit C to Declaration of Brian Cannon, #5 Exhibit D to Declaration of Brian Cannon, #6 Exhibit E to Declaration of Brian Cannon, #7 Exhibit F to Declaration of Brian Cannon, #8 Exhibit G to Declaration of Brian Cannon, #9 Exhibit H to Declaration of Brian Cannon, #10 Exhibit I to Declaration of Brian Cannon, #11 Exhibit J to Declaration of Brian Cannon, #12 Exhibit K to Declaration of Brian Cannon, #13 Exhibit L to Declaration of Brian Cannon, #14 Affidavit Declaration of Johanna Shelton, #15 Text of Proposed Order)(Cannon, Brian)
August 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 256 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #250 SEALED MOTION TO QUASH AND FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER filed by PA Advisors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of John M. Bustamante, #2 Affidavit Declaration of David Pridham, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A to Bustamante Declaration, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B to Bustamante Declaration, #5 Exhibit Exhibit C to Bustamante Declaration, #6 Exhibit Exhibit D to Bustamante Declaration, #7 Exhibit Exhibit E to Bustamante Declaration, #8 Exhibit Exhibit F to Bustamante Declaration, #9 Exhibit Exhibit G to Bustamante Declaration, #10 Exhibit Exhibit H to Bustamante Declaration, #11 Exhibit Exhibit I to Bustamante Declaration, #12 Exhibit Exhibit J to Bustamante Declaration, #13 Affidavit Declaration of Andrew Spangler, #14 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Denying Motion to Quash)(Bustamante, John)
August 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 255 REPLY to #248 Claim Construction Brief filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E (part 1), #6 Exhibit E (part 2), #7 Exhibit E (part 3), #8 Exhibit E (part 4), #9 Exhibit F, #10 Exhibit G, #11 Exhibit H, #12 Exhibit I, #13 Exhibit J, #14 Exhibit K, #15 Exhibit L)(Cannon, Brian)
August 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 254 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Marcus Bustamante on behalf of PA Advisors, LLC (Bustamante, John)
August 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 253 ORDER granting #251 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #250 SEALED MOTION TO QUASH AND FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER Responses due by 8/13/2009; The deadline for Defendants to file their Responsive Claim Construction Brief pursuant to Local Patent Rule 4-5(b) shall be extended to August 7, 2009. The deadline for Plaintiff to file its Reply Claim Construction Brief pursuant to Local Patent Rule 4-5(c) shall be extended to August 24, 2009.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 8/3/09. (mrm, )
July 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 252 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stanley H Thompson, Jr on behalf of PA Advisors, LLC (Thompson, Stanley)
July 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 251 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Google Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cannon, Brian)
July 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 250 SEALED MOTION TO QUASH AND FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER by Google Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sergey Brin, #2 Declaration of Brian Cannon, #3 Exhibit 1 to Cannon Declaration, #4 Exhibit 2 to Cannon Declaration, #5 Exhibit 3 to Cannon Declaration, #6 Exhibit 4 to Cannon Declaration, #7 Exhibit 5 to Cannon Declaration, #8 Exhibit 6 to Cannon Declaration, #9 Exhibit 7 to Cannon Declaration, #10 Exhibit 8 to Cannon Declaration, #11 Exhibit 9 to Cannon Declaration, #12 Exhibit 10 to Cannon Declaration, #13 Exhibit 11 to Cannon Declaration, #14 Exhibit 12 to Cannon Declaration, #15 Exhibit 13 to Cannon Declaration, #16 Exhibit 14 to Cannon Declaration, #17 Exhibit 15 to Cannon Declaration, #18 Exhibit 16 to Cannon Declaration, #19 Exhibit 17 to Cannon Declaration, #20 Exhibit 18 to Cannon Declaration, #21 Exhibit 19 to Cannon Declaration, #22 Exhibit 20 to Cannon Declaration, #23 Exhibit 21 to Cannon Declaration, #24 Exhibit 22 to Cannon Declaration, #25 Exhibit 23 to Cannon Declaration, #26 Exhibit 24 to Cannon Declaration, #27 Exhibit 25 to Cannon Declaration, #28 Exhibit 26 to Cannon Declaration, #29 Exhibit 27 to Cannon Declaration, #30 Exhibit 28 to Cannon Declaration, #31 Exhibit 29 to Cannon Declaration, #32 Exhibit 30 to Cannon Declaration, #33 Text of Proposed Order)(Cannon, Brian)
July 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 249 ANSWER to Complaint Answer to Google Inc.'s First Amended Counterclaim (Docket # 242) by PA Advisors, LLC.(Fenster, Marc)
June 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 248 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by PA Advisors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Anderson, Patrick)
June 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 247 ORDER granting #246 Motion for Extension of Time to File pla opening Claim Construction brief by June 29, 2009 and dfts responsive brief is due July 31, 2009.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 6/29/2009. (sm, )
June 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 246 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File by PA Advisors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Spangler, Andrew)
June 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 245 ORDER granting #243 Motion for Extension of Time to File opening claim construction brief by June 26, 2009 and responsive brief by July 28, 2009.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 6/26/2009. (sm, )
June 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 244 ORDER granting #241 Motion for Leave to File Amended ANswer to 2nd amended complaint.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 6/26/2009. (sm, )
June 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 243 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File P.R. 4-5(a) and 4-5(b) by PA Advisors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Anderson, Patrick)
June 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 242 GOOGLE'S FIRST AMENDED ANSWER to #187 Amended Complaint by Google Inc..(Cannon, Brian)
June 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 241 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Answer to Second Amended Complaint by Google Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cannon, Brian)
June 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 240 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Marc A Fenster on behalf of PA Advisors, LLC (Fenster, Marc)
June 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 239 ORDER granting #236 Motion for Extension of Time to File P.R. 4-5(a) to June 25, 2009 and P.R. 4-5(b) to July 27, 2009.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 6/16/2009. (sm, )
June 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 238 ORDER granting #235 Motion for Extension of Time to File P.R. 4-5 to July 2, 2009.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 6/16/2009. (sm, )
June 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 237 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ari Benjamin Rafilson on behalf of PA Advisors, LLC (Rafilson, Ari)
June 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 236 Amended MOTION for Extension of Time to File P.R. 4-5(a) and P.R. 4-5(b) by PA Advisors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Spangler, Andrew)
June 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 235 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File P.R. 4-5(a) and 4-5(b) by PA Advisors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Spangler, Andrew)
June 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 234 ORDER, granting #233 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (John Edmonds) filed by PA Advisors, LLC., Attorney John J Edmonds terminated.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 6/3/09. (mrm, )
June 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 233 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (John Edmonds) by PA Advisors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Edmonds, John)
May 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 232 NOTICE by PA Advisors, LLC PR 4-3 Submission of the Parties (Edmonds, John)
May 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 231 ORDER granting #230 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The deadline for the parties to comply with P.R. 4-3 shall be extended to May 22, 2009.All other dates remain unchanged.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 5/19/09. (ch, )
May 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 230 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File by Google Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cannon, Brian)
March 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 229 NOTICE by PA Advisors, LLC of Asserted Claims (Edmonds, John)
January 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 228 ORDER, granting #227 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by PA Advisors, LLC., Attorney Joseph Diamante terminated.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 1/29/09. (mrm, )
January 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 227 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by PA Advisors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Edmonds, John)
December 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 226 ORDER denying #222 Motion to Intervene. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 12/30/08. (mrm, )
December 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 225 RESPONSE in Opposition re #222 MOTION to Intervene DEFENDANTS' AND PLAINTIFF'S JOINT OPPOSITION TO THIRD PARTY MOTIONS filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cannon, Brian)
December 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 224 ORDER, granting #223 Consent MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by PA Advisors, LLC., Attorney Jonathan T Suder; Karolyne Hu Cheng and Michael T Cooke terminated.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 12/16/08. (mrm, )
December 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 223 Consent MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by PA Advisors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Spangler, Andrew)
December 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 222 MOTION to Intervene by Jonathan Lee Riches, Albert J Pirro (Modified to remove Page 2 of pleading from same movant to be filed in another case). (ehs, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/9/2008: #1 Motion) (sm, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/9/2008: #2 Envelope) (sm, ). Modified on 12/9/2008 (sm, ).
November 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 221 NOTICE by Google Inc. Defendant Google Inc.'s Notice of Compliance With Patent Rules 3-3 and 3-4 (Beck, David)
November 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 220 ORDER; the Court sua sponte ORDERS both parties to meet and confer in accordance with Local Rule CV-7(h). Further, the Court ORDERS that before filing any discovery related motion, the parties must meet and confer in person with local counsel present. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 11/7/08. (mrm, )
October 27, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 219 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney David A Perlson for Google Inc.. (APPROVED FEE PAID 2-1-4181)(ehs, )
October 27, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 218 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Andrea Pallios Roberts for Google Inc.. (APPROVED FEE PAID 2-1-4181) (ehs, )
October 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 217 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John J. Edmonds on behalf of PA Advisors, LLC (Edmonds, John)
October 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 216 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 10-6-08, Motion Hearing, 11 pages before Judge David Folsom. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Libby Crawford,Telephone number: 903.794.4067 Ext. 237. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 11/6/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/17/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/14/2009. (aec, )
October 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 215 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 10/8/08. (mrm, )
October 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ORDER regarding parties opposed motion for protective order (#175) and court will enter plaintiffs proposed protective order for reasons set forth.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 10/7/2008. (sm, )
October 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 213 NOTICE by PA Advisors, LLC Notice for Entry of Protective Order (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Spangler, Andrew)
October 6, 2008 Opinion or Order EXHIBIT offered at Motion hearing placed in Texarkana vault. (mrm, )
October 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 212 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge David Folsom: Motion Hearing held on 10/6/2008 re #175 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Google Inc.. (Court Reporter Libby Crawford.) (mrm, )
October 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 211 DISCOVERY ORDER re: #210 Motion for Entry of Discovery Order. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 10/2/08. (mrm, )
October 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 210 Agreed MOTION for Entry of Agreed Discovery Order by PA Advisors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Spangler, Andrew)
September 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 209 ORDER granting #208 Motion to Dismiss deft 24/7 Real Media Inc with prejudice, all attorney fees and costs are to be borne by the party incurring same. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 9/26/08. (ehs, )
September 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 208 Consent MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice by PA Advisors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Spangler, Andrew)
September 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 207 RESPONSE to #200 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Defendant Yahoo! Inc. by PA Advisors, LLC. (Cooke, Michael)
September 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 206 RESPONSE to #198 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim of Defendant Google Inc. by PA Advisors, LLC. (Cooke, Michael)
September 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 205 RESPONSE to #199 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim of Defendant 24/7 Real Media, Inc. by PA Advisors, LLC. (Cooke, Michael)
September 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORDER granting #202 Motion to Dismiss claims and counterclaims between plaintiff and dft ContextWeb, Inc ORDERING that claims are dismissed with prejudice.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 9/23/2008. (sm, )
September 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 203 BRIEF filed DEFENDANTS' SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF REGARDING LOCATION OF SOURCE CODE INSPECTIONS by Google Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Cannon, Brian)
September 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 202 Consent MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice by PA Advisors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Spangler, Andrew)
September 22, 2008 Opinion or Order ***Docket Correction re: Document # 188, Order. The hearing referred to in the order is being held in Marshall, Tx.*** (mrm, )
September 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 201 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Karolyne Hu Cheng on behalf of PA Advisors, LLC (Cheng, Karolyne)
September 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 200 Yahoo!, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint (Second Amended), AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND, COUNTERCLAIM against PA Advisors, LLC by Yahoo! Inc..(White, Jason)
September 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ANSWER to #187 Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM (Defendant 24/7 Real Media, Inc.'s Answer and Counterclaims to PA Advisors, LLC's Second Amended Complaint) against PA Advisors, LLC by 24/7 Real Media, Inc..(Blank, James)
September 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ANSWER to #187 Amended Complaint Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against PA Advisors, LLC by Google Inc..(Beck, David)
September 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 197 ORDER, granting #195 Consent MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice filed by PA Advisors, LLC., Specific Media, Inc. terminated.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 9/10/08. (mrm, )
September 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER granting #190 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Initial Disclosures. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 9/9/08. (mrm, )
September 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 195 Consent MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice by PA Advisors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Spangler, Andrew)
September 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 194 NOTICE by Google Inc. Notice of Compliance with Disclosure Requirements (Beck, David)
September 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 193 NOTICE of Disclosure by Yahoo! Inc. of Yahoo's Initial Disclosures (White, Jason)
September 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 192 NOTICE by 24/7 Real Media, Inc. (DEFENDANT AND COUNTERCLAIMANT 24/7 REAL MEDIA, INC.'S NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE) (Sherman, Howard)
September 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ORDER, granting #189 MOTION to Dismiss Facebook, Inc. filed by PA Advisors, LLC., Facebook, Inc. terminated.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 9/4/08. (mrm, )
September 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 190 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO COMPLETE INITIAL DISCLOSURES by Specific Media, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wilcox, Melvin)
September 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 189 MOTION to Dismiss Facebook, Inc. by PA Advisors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Anderson, Patrick)
August 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #175 MOTION for Protective Order : Motion Hearing set for 10/6/2008 10:30 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge David Folsom. Each side shall have ten (10) minutes to present their arguments on all the matters.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 8/29/08. (mrm, ) Modified on 9/10/2008 (mrm, ).
August 27, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 187 AMENDED COMPLAINT Second Amended Complaint for Patent Infringement against all defendants, filed by PA Advisors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Cooke, Michael)
August 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 186 AGREED SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/1/2010 in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge David Folsom. Jury Selection set for 3/2/2010 in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge David Folsom. Parties to file proposed joint final pretrial order, proposed jury instructions and verdict form at least 2 weeks before pretrial conference.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 8/25/2008. (sm, )
August 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER granting #180 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery; The Plaintiff has a 30 day extension of time to serve Infringement Contentions on Defendant Facebook, Inc. pursuant to Local Patent Rules 3.1 through 3.2, making the Infringement Contentions due September 22, 2008.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 8/25/08. (mrm, )
August 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ORDER granting #178 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery; The Plaintiff has a 30 day extension of time to serve Infringement Contentions on Defendant Specific Media, Inc. pursuant to Local Patent Rules 3.1 through 3.2, making the Infringement Contentions due September 22, 2008.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 8/25/08. (mrm, )
August 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER granting #179 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery; The Plaintiff has a 30 day extension of time to serve Infringement Contentions on Defendant ContextWeb, Inc. pursuant to Local Patent Rules 3.1 through 3.2, making the Infringement Contentions due September 22, 2008.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 8/25/08. (mrm, )
August 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER, granting #177 MOTION to Dismiss (Stipulated) of Seevast Corporation and Pulse 360, Inc. filed by PA Advisors, LLC.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 8/25/08. (mrm, )
August 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 181 NOTICE of Disclosure by PA Advisors, LLC (Plaintiff's Notice of P.R. 3-1 and 3-2 Disclosures) (Anderson, Patrick)
August 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 180 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery of P.R. 3-1 & 3-2 to Facebook, Inc. by PA Advisors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Anderson, Patrick)
August 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 179 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery of P.R. 3-1 & 3-2 to Contextweb by PA Advisors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Anderson, Patrick)
August 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 178 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery of P.R. 3-1 & 3-2 to Specific Media, Inc. by PA Advisors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Anderson, Patrick)
August 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 177 MOTION to Dismiss (Stipulated) of Seevast Corporation and Pulse 360, Inc. by PA Advisors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Anderson, Patrick)
August 19, 2008 Opinion or Order ***FILED IN ERROR, ORDERS CANNOT BE FILED SEPARATELY, MUST BE AN ATTACHMENT TO FILING OF MAIN DOCUMENT. CLERK HAS TAKEN PDF ORDER AND ATTACHED TO #173 and #175) Document # 174 and #176, Additional Attachments. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (sm, )
August 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE.***Additional Attachments to Main Document: #175 MOTION for Protective Order.. (Cannon, Brian) Modified on 8/19/2008 (sm, ).
August 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 175 MOTION for Protective Order by Google Inc.. (Cannon, Brian) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/19/2008: #1 Agreed Protective Order) (sm, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/19/2008: #2 Certificate of Conference) (sm, ).
August 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE.***Additional Attachments to Main Document: #173 MOTION ENTRY OF PROPOSED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER.. (Cannon, Brian) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/19/2008: # 1 Docket Control Orde) (sm, ). Modified on 8/19/2008 (sm, ).
August 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 173 MOTION ENTRY OF PROPOSED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER by Google Inc.. (Cannon, Brian) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/19/2008: #1 Docket Control Order) (sm, ).
August 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 172 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 7-24-08, Status Hearing, 16 pages before Judge David Folsom. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Libby Crawford,Telephone number: 903.794.4067 Ext 237. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 9/8/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/17/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/17/2008. (aec, )
August 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 171 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by PA Advisors, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Granicus IP, LLC for PA Advisors, LLC. (Anderson, Patrick)
August 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER denying #33 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part #33 Motion for More Definite Statement; denying #95 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff has leave to amend in accordance with Section III.B above and must file the amended complaint within twenty (20) days.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 8/7/2008. (sm, )
August 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER granting #168 Motion to Dismiss. Claims against Dfts Fast Search & Transfer ASA, Fast Search & Transfer, Inc. and AgentArts, Inc. are dismissed with prejudice and the parties shall bear their own attorney fees and expenses and costs. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 8/6/08. (ch, )
August 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 168 MOTION to Dismiss Fast Search & Transfer ASA, Fast Search & Transfer, Inc., and AgentArts, Inc. by PA Advisors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Anderson, Patrick)
July 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 167 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge David Folsom: Status Conference held on 7/24/2008. (Court Reporter Libby Crawford.) (rml, )
July 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER re #64 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by PA Advisors, LLC, WPP Group USA, Inc. terminated. ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that all claims or causes of action asserted in this suit against Defendant WPP Group USA, Inc are hereby dismissed with out prejudice to the right of the Plaintiff to assert any such claims in the future.It is further ORDERED that all attorneys fees and costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 7/24/08. (mpv, )
July 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER Due to the large number of patent cases pending on the Courts docket, resulting involuminous motion practice, the Court finds it necessary to implement procedures applying to futuremotions to be submitted in recently filed cases. This procedure is necessary to allow the Court tomanage its docket in a timely fashion.The procedure is as follows:Summary Judgment Motions: Prior to filing any summary judgment motion, the parties mustsubmit letter briefs seeking permission to file the motion. The opening letter brief in each of thosematters shall be no longer than five (5) pages and shall be filed with the Court no later than sixty(60) days before the deadline for filing summary judgment motions. Answering letter briefs in eachof those matters shall be no longer than five (5) pages and filed with the Court no later than fourteen(14) days thereafter. Reply briefs in each of those matters shall be no longer than three (3) pagesand filed with the Court no later than five (5) days thereafter. The Court shall hold a hearing ortelephone conference to hear arguments and to determine whether the filing of any motion will bepermitted.Motions to Strike Expert Testimony/Daubert Motions: Prior to filing any Motions to Strikeor Daubert Motions, the parties must submit letter briefs seeking permission to file the motion. Theopening letter brief in each of those matters shall be no longer than three (3) pages and shall be filedwith the Court no later than sixty (60) days before the deadline for filing Motions to Strike orDaubert Motions. Answering letter briefs in each of those matters shall be no longer than three (3)pages and filed with the Court no later than fourteen (14) days thereafter. Reply briefs in each ofthose matters shall be no longer than two (2) pages and filed with the Court no later than five (5)days thereafter. The Court shall hold a hearing or telephone conference to hear arguments and todetermine whether the filing of any motion will be permitted.Motions in Limine: Prior to filing any Motions in Limine, the parties must submit letterbriefs seeking permission to file the motion. The opening letter brief in each of those matters shallbe no longer than three (3) pages and shall be filed with the Court no later than sixty (60) daysbefore the deadline for filing Motions in Limine. Answering letter briefs in each of those mattersshall be no longer than three (3) pages and filed with the Court no later than fourteen (14) daysthereafter. Reply briefs in each of those matters shall be no longer than two (2) pages and filed withthe Court no later than five (5) days thereafter. The Court shall hold a hearing or telephoneconference to hear arguments and to determine whether the filing of any motion will be permitted.For all of the above mentioned motions, the letter briefs shall be filed without exhibits. Anyrequests to submit letter briefs after the deadlines outlined above must show good cause. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 7/24/08. (mpv, )
July 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER dismissing WITHOUT PREJUDICE #93 Motion to Dismiss; dismissing WITHOUT PREJUDICE #117 Motion to Change Venue. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 7/24/08. (mpv, )
July 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 163 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melissa Richards Smith on behalf of 24/7 Real Media, Inc. (Smith, Melissa)
July 24, 2008 Opinion or Order ***FILED IN ERROR, PDF IS ORDER, ORDER ATTACHED TO #161 BY CLERK***. Document # 162, Conference Report. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ljw, )
July 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 162 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (proposed docket control order). (Smith, Melissa) Modified on 7/24/2008 (rml, ). Modified on 7/24/2008 (ljw, ).
July 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 161 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Case management Report). (Smith, Melissa) Modified on 7/24/2008 (rml, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/24/2008: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (ljw, ).
July 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER granting #158 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney J Mike Amerson and Danny Lloyd Williams terminated. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 7/23/08. (mpv, )
July 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 159 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Allen Franklin Gardner on behalf of Yahoo! Inc. (Gardner, Allen)
July 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 158 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR WITHDRAWAL OF REPRESENTATION) by PA Advisors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Danny)
July 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 157 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael T Cooke on behalf of PA Advisors, LLC (Cooke, Michael)
July 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 156 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jonathan T Suder on behalf of PA Advisors, LLC (Suder, Jonathan)
July 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER setting a status conference and prior to status conference, the parties shall confer by telephone regarding a scheduling order. The Court current has dates open for claim construction on Sept 3 or 17 of 2009. With these dates in mind, the partise are to submit a 26(f) Conference report one (1) Day before status conference ( Status Conference set for 7/24/2008 10:00 AM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before Judge David Folsom.). Signed by Judge David Folsom on 7/15/2008. (sm, )
July 14, 2008 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 7/24/2008 10:00 AM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before Judge David Folsom. (mrm, )
July 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER granting #153 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney David R Childress, and Mack Ed Swindle are terminated as counsel for Dfts Fast Search & Transfer, Inc., and AgentArts, Inc.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 7/11/08. (ch, )
July 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 153 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Fast Search & Transfer, Inc., AgentArts, Inc.. (Childress, David) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/11/2008: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (sm, ).
July 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 152 NOTICE of Change of Address by James S Blank (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Blank, James)
July 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 151 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by G William Lavender on behalf of Fast Search & Transfer, Inc., AgentArts, Inc. (Lavender, G)
July 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 150 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Howard I Sherman for WPP Group USA, Inc. and 24/7 Real Media, Inc.. (FEE PAID) 2-1-3932 (ehs, )
July 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge David Folsom for all further proceedings. Judge Leonard Davis no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 7/9/08. (ehs, )
July 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge T. John Ward recused. Case reassigned to Judge Leonard Davis for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 7/2/08. (ch, )
July 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER granting #145 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Miyoung Shin and Richard D Watkins terminated as counsel for Dft Yahoo! Inc.. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 7/2/08. (ch, )
June 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER The parties shall be prepared to inform the Court whether they will consent to trial before the Magistrate Judge. The parties shall submit their proposed docket control and discovery orders to the court on August 12, 2008.Disclosure of Asserted Claims and Infringement Contentions is due on September 9, 2008. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 6/26/08. (ehs, )
June 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 145 Consent MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney R. Watkins and M. Shin by Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
June 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 144 NOTICE of Change of Address by Michael Edwin Jones (Jones, Michael)
June 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER granting #142 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christopher M Sheehan; Lee T Gesmer and Joseph J Laferrera terminated. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on June 20, 2008. (jml, )
June 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 142 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Fast Search & Transfer, Inc., AgentArts, Inc.. (Childress, David) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/13/2008: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (sm, ).
June 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 141 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Ben Frey for Fast Search & Transfer, Inc. and AgentArts, Inc. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 2-1-3860. (ch, )
June 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 140 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Richard A Cederoth for Fast Search & Transfer, Inc. and AgentArts, Inc. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 2-1-3860. (ch, )
June 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 139 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Douglas I Lewis for Fast Search & Transfer, Inc. and AgentArts, Inc. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 2-1-3860. (ch, )
June 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 138 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Patrick Rolf Anderson on behalf of PA Advisors, LLC (Anderson, Patrick)
June 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 137 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Evelyn Y Chen on behalf of Fast Search & Transfer, Inc., AgentArts, Inc. (Chen, Evelyn)
June 10, 2008 Opinion or Order ***FILED IN ERROR. Document # Notice, 136. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (Attorney will refile)(ch, )
June 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ***FILED IN ERROR. ATTORNEY WILL REFILE.***NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Evelyn Y Chen on behalf of Fast Search & Transfer, Inc., AgentArts, Inc., Fast Search & Transfer ASA (Chen, Evelyn) Modified on 6/10/2008 (ch, ).
May 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER - granting #94 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. Dft WPP Group plc is hereby dismissed without prejudice to the right of the plaintiff to assert any such claims in the future. All attorney fee's and costs are to be bornee by the party that incurred them. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 5/28/08. (ch, )
May 27, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 134 NOTICE of Disclosure by Fast Search & Transfer, Inc., AgentArts, Inc., Fast Search & Transfer ASA Amended (Childress, David)
May 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER granting #132 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Amy Elizabeth LaValle terminated. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 5/1/08. (ehs, )
April 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 132 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by PA Advisors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(LaValle, Amy)
April 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 131 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #117 MOTION to Change Venue to the USDC for the Eastern District of New York by ContextWeb, Inc. filed by PA Advisors, LLC. (LaValle, Amy)
April 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER granting #128 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Darryl M Woo; Darren E Donnelly and David M Lacy Kusters terminated as counsel for FaceBook Inc. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 4/7/08. (ch, )
April 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 129 REPLY to Response to Motion re #117 MOTION to Change Venue to the USDC for the Eastern District of New York ContextWeb's Reply Memorandum In Support of Motion To Transfer filed by ContextWeb, Inc.. (Hanft, James)
April 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 128 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney DEFENDANT FACEBOOK, INC.'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Order)(Donnelly, Darren)
April 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 127 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Thomas J Gray for Facebook, Inc. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 2-1-3360. (ch, )
April 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 126 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Indra Neel Chatterjee for Facebook, Inc. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 2-1-3660. (ch, )
April 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 125 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Monte M F Cooper for Facebook, Inc. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 2-1-3660. (ch, )
April 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 124 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrew Wesley Spangler on behalf of PA Advisors, LLC (Spangler, Andrew)
March 27, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 123 RESPONSE in Opposition re #117 MOTION to Change Venue to the USDC for the Eastern District of New York by ContextWeb, Inc. filed by PA Advisors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Declaration of Amy E. LaValle in Support of Plaintiff's Response to ContextWeb, Inc.'s Motion to Transfer and Exhibits thereto)#2 Text of Proposed Order)(LaValle, Amy)
March 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 122 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by J Thad Heartfield on behalf of Facebook, Inc. (Heartfield, J)
March 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 121 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Christopher M Sheehan for Fast Search & Transfer, Inc. (FEE PAID) 2-1-3622 (ehs, ) Modified on 3/25/2008 (ch, ).
March 13, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER granting #119 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #117 MOTION to Change Venue to the USDC for the Eastern District of New York Responses due by 3/27/2008. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 3/13/08. (ch, )
March 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 119 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Contextweb, Inc's Motion to Transfer by PA Advisors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(LaValle, Amy)
March 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 118 NOTICE by ContextWeb, Inc. re #117 MOTION to Change Venue to the USDC for the Eastern District of New York Notice of Substitution of Exhibit #2 (Declaration of James Hanft In Support of ContextWeb Inc.'s Motion To Transfer With Exhibits 1 To 7 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of James Hanft In Support of ContextWeb Inc.'s Motion To Transfer With Exhibits 1 to 7)(Hanft, James)
March 4, 2008 NOTICE FROM CLERK re #117 MOTION to Change Venue to the USDC for the Eastern District of New York. An amended cert of conference, showing opposition by counsel, has been added to this entry. (Previous cert has a typo and shows unopposed) (sm, )
March 3, 2008 Opinion or Order ***FILED IN ERROR, NO PROPOSED ORDER OR EXHIBITS AND APPEARS TO BE A DUPLICATE, THIS MOTION HAS BEEN TERMINATED (ATTY HAS APPEARED TO HAVE REFILED(SEE #117). Document # 116, Motion to change venue. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (sm, )
February 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 117 MOTION to Change Venue to the USDC for the Eastern District of New York by ContextWeb, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Richard Sheldon In Support of ContexWeb, Inc.'s Motion To Transfer#2 Affidavit Declaration of James Hanft In Support of ContextWeb, Inc.'s Motion To Transfer with Exhibits 1 to 7#3 Text of Proposed Order Granting Defendant Context Web, Inc.'s Motion To Transfer)(Hanft, James) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/4/2008 (sm, ).
February 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE.***MOTION to Change Venue to USDC for the EDNY by ContextWeb, Inc.. (Hanft, James) Modified on 3/3/2008 (sm, ).
February 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER granting #114 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jim Mitchell Smith terminated as counsel of record. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 2/28/08. (ch, )
February 27, 2008 ***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 113, Motion. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (SEE CORRECTED DOCUMENT #114 )(ch, )
February 27, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 114 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney on behalf of Jim Mitchell Smith by Specific Media, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Jim)
February 27, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ***FILED IN ERROR SEE CORRECTED DOCUMENT #114 *** MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Specific Media, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Jim) Modified on 2/27/2008 (ch, ).
February 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 112 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #93 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint or, in the Alternative, for a More Definite Statement; Motion to Strike; and Motion to Stay Discovery; and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof of Facebook, Inc. filed by PA Advisors, LLC. (LaValle, Amy)
February 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER granting #110 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Eric M. Albritton terminated. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 2/25/08. (ehs, )
February 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 110 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by PA Advisors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Albritton, Eric)
February 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 109 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by J Mike Amerson on behalf of PA Advisors, LLC (Amerson, J)
February 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 108 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Danny Lloyd Williams on behalf of PA Advisors, LLC (Williams, Danny)
February 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 107 RESPONSE to #98 Answer to Amended Complaint,, Counterclaim, of Google Inc. by PA Advisors, LLC. (LaValle, Amy)
February 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 106 REPLY to Response to Motion re #93 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint or, in the Alternative, for a More Definite Statement; Motion to Strike; and Motion to Stay Discovery; and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Woo, Darryl)
February 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 105 RESPONSE to #88 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim of Seevast Corporation and Pulse 360, Inc. by PA Advisors, LLC. (LaValle, Amy)
February 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 104 RESPONSE to #86 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim of ContextWeb, Inc. by PA Advisors, LLC. (LaValle, Amy)
February 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 103 RESPONSE to #79 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Specific Media, Inc. by PA Advisors, LLC. (LaValle, Amy)
February 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 102 RESPONSE to #77 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by 24/7 Real Media, Inc. by PA Advisors, LLC. (LaValle, Amy)
February 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 101 RESPONSE in Opposition re #93 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint or, in the Alternative, for a More Definite Statement; Motion to Strike; and Motion to Stay Discovery; and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof of Facebook, Inc. filed by PA Advisors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(LaValle, Amy)
February 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 100 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Brian C Cannon for Google Inc. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 2-1-3462. (ch, ) Modified on 2/4/2008 (ch, ).
February 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 99 RESPONSE to Motion re #95 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, or in the Alternative, for a More Definate Statement by Yahoo! Inc. filed by PA Advisors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(LaValle, Amy)
January 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 98 Defendant Google Inc.'s Answer, Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims to PA Advisors, LLC's First Amended Complaint for Patent Infringement ANSWER to Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against PA Advisors, LLC by Google Inc..(Beck, David)
January 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 97 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #33 MOTION to Dismiss , or in the Alternative MOTION for More Definite Statement by Yahoo! Inc. filed by PA Advisors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Text of Proposed Order)(LaValle, Amy)
January 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 96 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Ernest Richardson on behalf of Google Inc. (Richardson, Michael)
January 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 95 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, or in the Alternative, for a More Definate Statement by Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bufe, John)
January 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 94 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by PA Advisors, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(LaValle, Amy)
January 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 93 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint or, in the Alternative, for a More Definite Statement; Motion to Strike; and Motion to Stay Discovery; and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Defendant Facebook, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint)(Lacy Kusters, David)
January 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 92 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Google Inc. to 1/29/2008. (ehs, )
January 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER granting #87 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Deadline for Google to answer reset to 1/29/08. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 1/23/08. (ehs, )
January 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER granting #85 Motion to Withdraw #52 motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 1/23/08. (ehs, )
January 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER denied as moot without prejudice #42 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 1/23/08. (ch, )
January 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ANSWER to Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against PA Advisors, LLC by Seevast Corporation, Pulse 360, Inc..(Fluskey, Robert)
January 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 87 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #58 Amended Complaint by Google Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Beck, David)
January 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 86 Defendant ContextWeb, Inc.'s ANSWER to Amended Complaint and, COUNTERCLAIM against PA Advisors, LLC by ContextWeb, Inc..(Hanft, James)
January 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 85 Consent MOTION to Withdraw Defendant 24/7 Real Media Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6), or in the Alternative, for a More Definite Statement Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(e), respectfully submitted by 24/7 Real Media, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Blank, James)
January 22, 2008 ***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 84, Order. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (Duplicate order please ignore #84, see Order #83 )(ch, )
January 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER denying #37 Motion to Dismiss. In dft's reply they informed the court that they withdraw their motion. Therefore the motion is denied as moot without prejudice. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 1/22/08. (ch, )
January 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER denying #37 Motion to Dismiss as moot without prejudice. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 1/22/08. (ehs, )
January 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER denying as moot #54 Motion to Dismiss. On 1/11/08 plaintiff filed a Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of WPP Group USA, Inc. #64 . Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 1/22/08. (ch, )
January 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER denying #36 Motion to Dismiss as moot without prejudice. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 1/22/08. (ehs, )
January 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER granting #78 Motion to Withdraw. ContextWeb, Inc. Motion #44 is hereby withdrawn. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 1/22/08. (ch, )
January 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 79 Specific Media, Inc.'s ANSWER to Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against PA Advisors, LLC by Specific Media, Inc..(Wilcox, Melvin)
January 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 78 MOTION to Withdraw #44 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.12(b)(6) Unopposed by ContextWeb, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Defendant ContextWeb, Inc.'s Withdrawal of Its Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.12(b)(6))(Hanft, James)
January 18, 2008 Opinion or Order ***FILED IN ERROR, ATTY MUST FILE A MOTION TO WITHDRAW A PLEADING***. Document # 76, Notice of Withdrawal. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (sm, )
January 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 77 Defendant 24/7 Real Media, Inc.'s ANSWER to Amended Complaint of PA Advisors, LLC, COUNTERCLAIM against PA Advisors, LLC by 24/7 Real Media, Inc..(Blank, James)
January 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ***FILED IN ERROR, PER ATTY, PLEASE IGNORE.***NOTICE by 24/7 Real Media, Inc. re #52 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6), or, in the Alternative, for a More Definite Statement Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(e) MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6), or, in the Alternative, for a More Definite Statement Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(e) - Notice of Withdrawal of Motion (Blank, James) Modified on 1/18/2008 (sm, ).
January 18, 2008 Opinion or Order ***FILED IN ERROR, MUST BE REFILED AS A MOTION***. Document # 73, Notice. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (sm, )
January 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 75 REPLY to Response to Motion re #33 MOTION to Dismiss , or in the Alternative MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by Yahoo! Inc.. (Jones, Michael)
January 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 74 REPLY to Response to Motion re #42 MOTION to Dismiss or In the Alternative, For a More Definite Statement filed by Seevast Corporation, Pulse 360, Inc.. (Fluskey, Robert)
January 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE.***NOTICE by ContextWeb, Inc. re #44 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.12(b)(6) of Withdrawal of ContextWeb, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss (Hanft, James) Modified on 1/18/2008 (sm, ).
January 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 72 REPLY to Response to Motion re #36 MOTION to Dismiss And To Strike, Or, In The Alternative, For A More Definite Statement; And Motion To Stay Discovery (Withdrawal) filed by Fast Search & Transfer, Inc., AgentArts, Inc.. (Laferrera, Joseph)
January 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Fast Search & Transfer, Inc., AgentArts, Inc..(Laferrera, Joseph)
January 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 70 REPLY to Response to Motion re #37 MOTION to Dismiss Or, in the Alternative, for a More Definite Statement; Motion to Strike; and Motion to Stay Discovery; and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Lacy Kusters, David)
January 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 69 RESPONSE to #34 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Specific Media, Inc. by PA Advisors, LLC. (LaValle, Amy)
January 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 68 RESPONSE to #39 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, of Google Inc. by PA Advisors, LLC. (LaValle, Amy)
January 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 67 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (No parent corporation) filed by Yahoo! Inc. (Watkins, Richard) Modified on 1/15/2008 (sm, ).
January 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 66 RESPONSE in Opposition re #52 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6), or, in the Alternative, for a More Definite Statement Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(e) MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6), or, in the Alternative, for a More Definite Statement Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(e) by 24/7 Real Media Inc. filed by PA Advisors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(LaValle, Amy)
January 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 65 RESPONSE to Motion re #54 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(6) or, in the Alternative, for a More Definite Statement MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(6) or, in the Alternative, for a More Definite Statement by WPP Group USA, Inc. filed by PA Advisors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(LaValle, Amy)
January 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 64 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by PA Advisors, LLC (LaValle, Amy) Additional attachment(s) added on 1/16/2008 (sm, ).
January 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 63 RESPONSE in Opposition re #44 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.12(b)(6) by ContextWeb, Inc. filed by PA Advisors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(LaValle, Amy)
January 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 62 RESPONSE in Opposition re #36 MOTION to Dismiss And To Strike, Or, In The Alternative, For A More Definite Statement; And Motion To Stay Discovery by Fast Search & Transfer, Inc. and AgentArts, Inc. filed by PA Advisors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(LaValle, Amy)
January 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 61 RESPONSE in Opposition re #37 MOTION to Dismiss Or, in the Alternative, for a More Definite Statement; Motion to Strike; and Motion to Stay Discovery; and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof by Facebook, Inc. filed by PA Advisors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(LaValle, Amy)
January 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 60 RESPONSE in Opposition re #42 MOTION to Dismiss or In the Alternative, For a More Definite Statement by Seevast and Pulse 360 filed by PA Advisors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(LaValle, Amy)
January 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 59 RESPONSE to Motion re #33 MOTION to Dismiss , or in the Alternative MOTION for More Definite Statement by Yahoo! Inc. filed by PA Advisors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(LaValle, Amy)
January 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 58 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against all defendants, filed by PA Advisors, LLC.(LaValle, Amy)
January 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 57 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew D Orwig on behalf of ContextWeb, Inc. (Orwig, Matthew)
January 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 56 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Joseph Diamante for PA Advisors, LLC. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 2-1-3360 (ch, )
December 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 55 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #54 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(6) or, in the Alternative, for a More Definite Statement MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(6) or, in the Alternative, for a More Definite Statement -- Declaration of Firouzeh Bahrampour filed by WWP Group USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Blank, James)
December 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 54 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(6) or, in the Alternative, for a More Definite Statement by WWP Group USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order #2 Certificate of Service)(Blank, James)
December 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 53 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by WWP Group USA, Inc. identifying WPP Group plc as Corporate Parent (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Blank, James) Modified on 12/27/2007 (mpv, ).
December 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ***WITHDRAWN PER ORDER #90 *** MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6), or, in the Alternative, for a More Definite Statement Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(e) by 24/7 Real Media, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order #2 Certificate of Service)(Blank, James) Modified on 1/23/2008 (ehs, ).
December 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 51 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by 24/7 Real Media, Inc. identifying Young & Rubicam Inc and WPP Group PLC as Corporate Parent (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Blank, James) Modified on 12/27/2007 (mpv, ).
December 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 49 NOTICE of Disclosure by Fast Search & Transfer, Inc. identifying Fast Holdings N A, Fast Search & Transfer International AS and Fast Search & Transfer AS as Corporate Parent, AgentArts, Inc. identifying Fast Search & Transfer Inc, Fast Holdings N A, Fast Search & Transfer International AS and Fast Search & Transfer ASA as Corporate Parent. Corporate Disclosure Statement (Childress, David) Modified on 12/27/2007 (mpv, ).
December 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 48 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David Michael Pridham on behalf of PA Advisors, LLC (Pridham, David)
December 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 47 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Amy Elizabeth LaValle on behalf of PA Advisors, LLC (LaValle, Amy)
December 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ***WITHDRAWN PER ORDER #80 *** MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.12(b)(6) by ContextWeb, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Defendant Contextweb, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6))(Hanft, James) Modified on 1/22/2008 (ch, ).
December 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 43 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by ContextWeb, Inc. identifying None as Corporate Parent. (Hanft, James) Modified on 12/27/2007 (mpv, ).
December 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 50 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Craig S Summers for Specific Media, Inc. (FEE PAID) 2-1-3341 (ehs, )
December 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 46 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Joseph S Cianfrani for Specific Media, Inc. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 2-1-3342. (ch, )
December 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 45 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Matthew S Bellinger for Specific Media, Inc. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 2-1-3340. (ch, )
December 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MOTION to Dismiss or In the Alternative, For a More Definite Statement by Seevast Corporation, Pulse 360, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kruse, C)
December 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 41 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Seevast Corporation identifying None as Corporate Parent, Pulse 360, Inc. identifying Seevast Corporation as Corporate Parent. (Kruse, C) Modified on 12/27/2007 (mpv, ). Modified on 12/27/2007 (mpv, ).
December 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 40 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Google Inc. identifying None as Corporate Parent. (Beck, David) Modified on 12/27/2007 (mpv, ).
December 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 39 Defendant Google Inc.'s Answer, Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims to PA Advisors, LLC's Original Complaint for Patent Infringement ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against PA Advisors, LLC by Google Inc..(Beck, David)
December 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 38 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Facebook, Inc. identifying None as Corporate Parent. (Woo, Darryl) Modified on 12/27/2007 (mpv, ). Additional attachment(s) Certificate of Service added on 1/4/2008 (mpv, ). Modified on 1/4/2008 (mpv, ).
December 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MOTION to Dismiss Or, in the Alternative, for a More Definite Statement; Motion to Strike; and Motion to Stay Discovery; and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Defendant Facebook, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss or, In the Alternative, for a More Definite Statement; Motion to Strike; and Motion to Stay Discovery)(Woo, Darryl) Additional attachment(s) Certificate of Conference added on 1/4/2008 (mpv, ). Modified on 1/4/2008 (mpv, ). Additional attachment(s) Corrected Certificate of Conference added on 1/4/2008 (mpv, ). Modified on 1/4/2008 (mpv, ).
December 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MOTION to Dismiss And To Strike, Or, In The Alternative, For A More Definite Statement; And Motion To Stay Discovery by Fast Search & Transfer, Inc., AgentArts, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gesmer, Lee) Additional attachment(s)(Corrected Proposed Order) added on 1/2/2008 (mpv, ). Modified on 1/2/2008 (mpv, ).
December 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 35 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Specific Media, Inc. identifying Interactive Media Holdings, Inc., a Delaware corporation as Corporate Parent. (Wilcox, Melvin)
December 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against PA Advisors, LLC by Specific Media, Inc..(Wilcox, Melvin)
December 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MOTION to Dismiss , or in the Alternative, MOTION for More Definite Statement by Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
December 14, 2007 Opinion or Order Answer Due Deadline Updated for ContextWeb, Inc. to 12/26/2007. (ehs, )
December 14, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #31 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Deadline for deft Contextweb, Inc to answer set for 12/26/07. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 12/14/07. (ehs, )
December 13, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by ContextWeb, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hanft, James)
December 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 30 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Lee T Gesmer for Fast Search & Transfer, Inc. and AgentArts, Inc. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 2-1-3313. (ch, )
December 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 29 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Joseph J Laferrera for Fast Search & Transfer, Inc. and AgentArts, Inc. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 2-1-3313. (ch, )
December 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Answer Due Deadline Updated for Fast Search & Transfer, Inc. to 12/24/2007; AgentArts, Inc. to 12/24/2007. (ch, )
December 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #24 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Dft's Fast Search & Transfer, Inc., and AgentArts, Inc. deadline is extended to 12/24/07. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 12/12/07. (ch, )
December 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 27 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Melvin C Garner for ContextWeb, Inc. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 2-1-3310. (ch, )
December 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 26 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Hiep Huu Nguyen for ContextWeb, Inc. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 2-13310. (ch, )
December 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 25 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney James E Hanft for ContextWeb, Inc. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 2-1-3310. (ch, )
December 7, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Fast Search & Transfer, Inc., AgentArts, Inc.. (Childress, David) Additional attachment(s)(Proposed Order) added on 12/7/2007 (ch, ). Modified on 12/7/2007 (ch, ).
November 28, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 23 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Darren E Donnelly on behalf of Facebook, Inc. (Donnelly, Darren)
November 28, 2007 Opinion or Order Answer Due Deadline Updated for WWP Group USA, Inc. to 12/27/2007; 24/7 Real Media, Inc. to 12/27/2007. (ch, )
November 28, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. 24/7 Real Media, Inc. and WPP Group USA, Inc. deadline is extended to 12/27/07. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 11/28/07. (ch, )
November 28, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David M Lacy Kusters on behalf of Facebook, Inc. (Kusters, David)
November 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Answer Due Deadline Updated for Seevast Corporation to 12/24/2007; Pulse 360, Inc. to 12/24/2007. (ch, )
November 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Seevast Corporation and Pulse 360, Inc. deadline is extended to 12/24/07. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 11/26/07. (ch, )
November 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 20 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney James S Blank for WWP Group USA, Inc. and WWP Group plc, 24/7 Real Media, Inc. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 2-1-3270 (ch, )
November 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 19 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Richard D Watkins for Yahoo! Inc. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 6-1-11877. (ch, )
November 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 18 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Miyoung Shin for Yahoo! Inc. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 6-1-11877. (ch, )
November 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Answer Due Deadline Updated for Specific Media, Inc. to 12/24/2007. (ch, )
November 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Specific Media deadline is 12/24/07. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 11/26/07. (ch, )
November 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 15 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Jason C White for Yahoo!, Inc. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 6-1-11850. (ch, ) Modified on 11/26/2007 (ch, ).
November 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time for 24/7 Real Media, Inc. and WPP Group USA, Inc. to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by WWP Group USA, Inc., 24/7 Real Media, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gillam, Harry)
November 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Seevast Corporation, Pulse 360, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Kruse, C)
November 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer until 12/24/07. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 11/21/07. (djh, )
November 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer until 12/24/07. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 11/21/07. (djh, )
November 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer until 12/24/07. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 11/21/07. (djh, )
November 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Specific Media, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Jim)
November 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 8 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Robert J Fluskey, Jr for Seevast Corporation and Pulse 360, Inc. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 2-1-3254. (ch, )
November 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 7 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Paul I Perlman for Seevast Corporation and Pulse 360, Inc. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 2-1-3254. (ch, )
November 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint (Unopposed) by Facebook, Inc.. (Woo, Darryl) Additional attachment(s) added on 11/20/2007 (ch, ).
November 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, [Unopposed] by Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
November 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Original Complaint by Google Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Beck, David)
November 6, 2007 Filing fee: $ 350.00, receipt number 2-1-3188 (ch, )
November 2, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 3 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Fast Search & Transfer, Inc., AgentArts, Inc., Seevast Corporation, Pulse 360, Inc., WWP Group USA, Inc., WWP Group plc, 24/7 Real Media, Inc., Google Inc., Yahoo! Inc., Facebook, Inc., ContextWeb, Inc., Specific Media, Inc., Fast Search & Transfer ASA. (ch, )
November 2, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding A Patent or Trademark. (Copy forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office.). (ehs, )
November 2, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Fast Search & Transfer, Inc., AgentArts, Inc., Seevast Corporation, Pulse 360, Inc., WWP Group USA, Inc., WWP Group plc, 24/7 Real Media, Inc., Google Inc., Yahoo! Inc., Facebook, Inc., ContextWeb, Inc., Specific Media, Inc., Fast Search & Transfer ASA (Filing fee $ 350.) , filed by PA Advisors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A part 1#2 Exhibit A part 2#3 Civil Cover Sheet)(ehs, )
November 2, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Fast Search & Transfer, Inc., AgentArts, Inc., Seevast Corporation, Pulse 360, Inc., WWP Group USA, Inc., WWP Group plc, 24/7 Real Media, Inc., Google Inc., Yahoo! Inc., Facebook, Inc., ContextWeb, Inc., Specific Media, Inc., Fast Search & Transfer ASA (Filing fee $ 350.) , filed by PA Advisors, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A part 1# 2 Exhibit A part 2# 3 Civil Cover Sheet)(ehs, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PA Advisors, LLC v. Google Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google Inc.
Represented By: David J Beck
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Represented By: David A Perlson
Represented By: Margaret Pirnie Kammerud
Represented By: Harry Lee Gillam, Jr
Represented By: Brian C Cannon
Represented By: Eugene Novikov
Represented By: Charles Kramer Verhoeven
Represented By: Michael Ernest Richardson
Represented By: Alison E Monahan
Represented By: Andrea Pallios Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook, Inc.
Represented By: J Thad Heartfield
Represented By: Indra Neel Chatterjee
Represented By: Darryl M Woo
Represented By: Thomas J Gray
Represented By: Monte M F Cooper
Represented By: David M Lacy Kusters
Represented By: Darren E Donnelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AgentArts, Inc.
Represented By: Evelyn Y Chen
Represented By: Douglas I Lewis
Represented By: Ben Frey
Represented By: Joseph J Laferrera
Represented By: Lee T Gesmer
Represented By: David R Childress
Represented By: G William Lavender
Represented By: Richard A Cederoth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 24/7 Real Media, Inc.
Represented By: James S Blank
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Represented By: Harry Lee Gillam, Jr
Represented By: Howard I Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WPP Group USA, Inc.
Represented By: James S Blank
Represented By: Harry Lee Gillam, Jr
Represented By: Howard I Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seevast Corporation
Represented By: Robert J Fluskey, Jr
Represented By: Paul I Perlman
Represented By: C Thomas Kruse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yahoo! Inc.
Represented By: William C Rooklidge
Represented By: David A Perlson
Represented By: Miyoung Shin
Represented By: John Frederick Bufe
Represented By: Allen Franklin Gardner
Represented By: Michael E Jones
Represented By: Jason C White
Represented By: Joshua Reed Thane
Represented By: Jennifer Haltom Doan
Represented By: Richard D Watkins
Represented By: John Scott Andrews
Represented By: Mansi H. Shah
Represented By: Scott D Sherwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pulse 360, Inc.
Represented By: Robert J Fluskey, Jr
Represented By: Paul I Perlman
Represented By: C Thomas Kruse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Specific Media, Inc.
Represented By: Craig S Summers
Represented By: Jim Mitchell Smith
Represented By: Matthew S Bellinger
Represented By: Melvin R Wilcox, III
Represented By: Joseph S Cianfrani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ContextWeb, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew D Orwig
Represented By: Melvin C Garner
Represented By: Hiep Huu Nguyen
Represented By: James E Hanft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WPP Group plc
Represented By: James S Blank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fast Search & Transfer ASA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fast Search & Transfer, Inc.
Represented By: Evelyn Y Chen
Represented By: Christopher M Sheehan
Represented By: Douglas I Lewis
Represented By: Ben Frey
Represented By: Joseph J Laferrera
Represented By: Lee T Gesmer
Represented By: David R Childress
Represented By: G William Lavender
Represented By: Richard A Cederoth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jonathan Lee Riches
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Albert J Pirro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PA Advisors, LLC
Represented By: Patrick Rolf Anderson
Represented By: John J Edmonds
Represented By: Andrew W. Spangler
Represented By: Danny Lloyd Williams
Represented By: Stanley H Thompson, Jr
Represented By: Amy Elizabeth LaValle
Represented By: Marc A Fenster
Represented By: Karolyne Hu Cheng
Represented By: Eric M. Albritton
Represented By: J Mike Amerson
Represented By: Alexander Chester Giza
Represented By: John Marcus Bustamante
Represented By: Adam S Hoffman
Represented By: David Michael Pridham
Represented By: Debera Wells Hepburn
Represented By: Andrew D Weiss
Represented By: Harold Kip Glasscock, Jr
Represented By: Elizabeth Stoebner Wiley
Represented By: Alan Wayne Brooks
Represented By: Todd Y Brandt
Represented By: Ari Benjamin Rafilson
Represented By: Jonathan T Suder
Represented By: Michael T Cooke
Represented By: Joseph Diamante
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?