IP Innovation LLC et al v. Google, Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiffs IP Innovation LLC and Technology Licensing Corp. alleges that defendant Google, Inc. infringed on U.S. Patents No. 5,276,785 entitled "Moving Viewpoint With Respect to a Target in a Three Dimensional Workspace" and No. 5,675,819 entitled "Document Information Retrieval Using Global Word Co-Occurrence Patterns."

Plaintiff: IP Innovation LLC and Technology Licensing Corporation
Defendant: Google, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2007cv00503
Filed: November 16, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Marshall Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Leonard Davis
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER granting 115 Stipulation of Dismissal. All claim and counterclaims asserted between plaintiff and Google are hereby dismissed with prejudice with each side to bear its own fees and costs. Signed by Judge Randall R. Rader on 1/29/2010. (ch, )
January 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 115 Agreed MOTION For Entry of Stipulation and Order of Dismissal with Prejudice by IP Innovation LLC, Technology Licensing Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit 1)(Gibbons, Paul) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/27/2010: # 2 REVISED ORDER) (ch, ).
January 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE - Google Inc. is requested to file any opposition to IP Innovation L.L.C.s Motion for a Protective Order Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 26(C) no later than 5:00 p.m. on 1/19/2010. Any reply by IP Innovation should be filed no later than 5:00 p.m. on 1/20/2010. Signed by Judge Randall R. Rader on 1/15/2010. (ch, )
January 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER granting 106 Joint Motion to Permit Parties to Conduct Depositions.The parties will be permitted to conduct depositions after 1/15/2010. Alldepositions should be completed by 1/29/2010. All other deadlines remain as set forth at the 12/30/09 status conference. Signed by Judge Randall R. Rader on 1/15/2010. (ch, )
January 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 108 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Unopposed Motion To Withdraw Douglas M. Hall As Counsel For IP Innovation LLC, And Technology Licensing Corporation by IP Innovation LLC, Technology Licensing Corporation. (Gibbons, Paul) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/15/2010: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (ch, ).
January 15, 2010 Opinion or Order NOTICE FROM CLERK - DUE TO CLERK ERROR DOCUMENT # 107 HAS BEEN ADDED BACK TO THE DOCKET PLEASE DISREGARD THE FILED IN ERROR. (ch, )
January 15, 2010 Opinion or Order ***CLERK ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD THIS FILED IN ERROR NOTICE.******FILED IN ERROR. FILED UNDER WRONG EVENT. Document # 107, Notice. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, ) Modified on 1/15/2010 (ch, ).
January 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 107 NOTICE by IP Innovation LLC, Technology Licensing Corporation Motion for a Protective Order Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 26(C) in District of Oregon (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Plaintiffs Motion for a Protective Order)(Mahalek, David) Modified on 1/15/2010 (ch, ). Modified on 1/15/2010 (ch, ).
January 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 106 MOTION Joint Motion to Permit Parties to Conduct Depositions After January 15, 2010 by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Beck, David)
January 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 105 Sealed Document. Defendant Google Inc.'s Second Amended Answer, Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims (Beck, David)
January 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 104 NOTICE by IP Innovation LLC, Technology Licensing Corporation Plaintiffs' Notice of Compliance (Gibbons, Paul)
January 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 103 NOTICE by Google, Inc. Defendant's Notice of Compliance (Beck, David)
January 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 102 MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER - the Court interprets the claim language in this case in the manner set forth above. For ease of reference, the Courts claim interpretations are set forth in Appendix A. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 1/7/10. (ehs, )
January 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER - denying 84 Motion to Reconsider or, in the Alternative, Certification of Questions for Interlocutory Appeal. Signed by Judge Randall R. Rader on 1/6/10. (ch, )
December 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Judge Randall R. Rader added. Judge Leonard Davis no longer assigned to case. (ehs, )
December 22, 2009 Opinion or Order *** Document # 100, Order corrected to read that the case was transferred to the docket of Judge Randall R Rader and not transferred to the docket in Washington..*** (ehs, )
December 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 100 Order TRANSFERRING case from the docket of Judge Leonard Davis to the docket of Randall R Rader ( ehs )
December 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER granting 98 Motion to Amend. Google is granted leave to supplement its invalidity contentions to add the Powers of Ten Video pursuant to Patent Rule 3-6. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/18/09. cc:attys 12-18-09 (mll, )
December 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 98 MOTION to Amend/Correct Defendant and Counterclaim-Plaintiff Google Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Leave to Supplement Invalidity Contentions by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Beck, David)
December 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 97 NOTICE of Disclosure by IP Innovation LLC, Technology Licensing Corporation Notice of Compliance with Expert Disclosure Requirements (Mahalek, David)
December 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 96 NOTICE by Google, Inc. Notice of Compliance with Expert Disclosure Requirements (Beck, David)
December 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 95 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Markman Proceedings held on 10/1/09 before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter Shea Sloan, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov. 73 pages. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 12/31/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/10/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/10/2010. (sms, )
December 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 94 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing Proceedings held on 9/2/09 before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter Shea Sloan, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov. 23 pages NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 12/31/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/10/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/10/2010. (sms, )
November 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER of preliminary determination of disputed terms regarding US Patent Nos. 5,675,819 and 5,276,785. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/12/09. cc:attys 11-12-09(mll, )
November 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER granting 91 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Court ORDERS that initial expert witness reports for which each party has the burden are due 12/9/09, and rebuttal expert witness reports are due 1/6/2010. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/10/09. (ch, )
November 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ***REPLACES # 90 *** MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Plaintiffs' Motion To Extend Expert Report Deadlines by IP Innovation LLC, Technology Licensing Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Conference, # 2 Declaration of David J. Mahalek, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Hall, Douglas) Modified on 11/10/2009 (ch, ).
November 9, 2009 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the 90 submitted by IP Innovation LLC, Technology Licensing Corporation. NO CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE. Correction should be made by one business day (ch, )
November 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT. NO CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE. PLEASE IGNORE. MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Plaintiffs' Motion To Extend Expert Report Deadlines by IP Innovation LLC, Technology Licensing Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Hall, Douglas) Modified on 11/9/2009 (ch, ).
October 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 89 SEALED REPLY in Support of its Motion for Reconsideration or, in the Alternative, Certification of Questions for Interlocutory Appeal re 84 SEALED MOTION for Reconsideration or, In The Alternative, Certification of Questions for Interlocutory Appeal filed by Google, Inc.. (Beck, David)
October 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 88 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 84 SEALED MOTION for Reconsideration or, In The Alternative, Certification of Questions for Interlocutory Appeal filed by IP Innovation LLC, Technology Licensing Corporation. (Mahalek, David)
October 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 87 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jack Wesley Hill on behalf of IP Innovation LLC, Technology Licensing Corporation(Hill, Jack) Modified on 10/20/2009 (ch, ). ( Modified per attorney request)
October 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 86 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 84 SEALED MOTION for Reconsideration or, In The Alternative, Certification of Questions for Interlocutory Appeal. (Attachments: # 1 certificate of conference, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Richardson, Michael)
October 6, 2009 Opinion or Order NOTICE FROM CLERK - Notice of Deficiency was removed on # 84, attorney will file Certificate of Conference as an additional attachment to # 84. (ch, )
October 5, 2009 Opinion or Order ***DISREGARD NOTICE OF DIFICIENCY***NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the 84 submitted by Google, Inc.. NO CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE OR ORDER. Correction should be made by one business day (ch, ) Modified on 10/6/2009 (ch, ).
October 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER that parties each pay $13,125.00 to Michael T McLemore, the technical consultant to the Court, for services through 10-02-2009, for the total amount of $26,250.00. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/05/09. cc:attys 10-05-09(mll, )
October 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 84 SEALED MOTION for Reconsideration or, In The Alternative, Certification of Questions for Interlocutory Appeal by Google, Inc.. (Richardson, Michael) Modified on 10/5/2009 (ch, ). Modified on 10/6/2009 (ch, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/6/2009: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (ch, ).
October 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 83 Minute Entry - 10.1.2009 Markman Hrg for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Markman Hearing held on 10/1/2009. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (rlf, )
September 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 82 JOINT CLAIM CONSTRUCTION CHART filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Beck, David)
September 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 81 REPLY to 68 Claim Construction Brief filed by IP Innovation LLC, Technology Licensing Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Hall, Douglas)
September 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 80 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 50 Sealed Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Standing. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/21/09. cc:attys 9-21-09 (mll, )
September 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 79 NOTICE by Google, Inc. Notice Regarding Estimated Amount of Time Requested for Markman Hearing (Beck, David)
September 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 78 AFFIDAVIT in Support Declaration of Norman I. Badler, Ph.D Regarding Claim Construction for U.S. Patent No. 5,276,785 re: 75 by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Beck, David)
September 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 77 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT - Appendix of Exhibits in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Responsive Claim Construction Brief Pursuant to Patent Rule 4-5(b) re: 75 . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T, # 21 Exhibit U, # 22 Exhibit V, # 23 Exhibit W, # 24 Exhibit X)(Beck, David)
September 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 76 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT - Declaration of W. Bruce Croft, Ph.D Regarding Claim Construction for U.S. Patent No. 5,675,891 re 75 by Google, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Beck, David) Modified on 9/8/2009 (sm, ).
September 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 75 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT (RESPONSIVE CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF) by Google, Inc.. (Beck, David) Modified on 9/8/2009 (sm, ).
September 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 74 Supplemental Joint CLAIM CONSTRUCTION and Prehearing Statement filed by IP Innovation LLC, Technology Licensing Corporation, Google, Inc.. (Beck, David)
September 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 73 Minute Entry - 9.2.09 Motion Hearing for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Motion Hearing held on 9/2/2009 re 50 SEALED MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Standing filed by Google, Inc. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (rlf)
August 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ANSWER to Complaint Plaintiffs' Reply to Defendant Google's Amended Counterclaims by IP Innovation LLC, Technology Licensing Corporation.(Hall, Douglas)
August 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER granting 70 Motion to Clarify Deadline. The deadline for Google Inc to file its PR 4-5(b) brief is 9-08-2009. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/26/09. cc:attys 8-26-09 (mll, )
August 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 70 Amended MOTION to Clarify Deadline Amended Unopposed Motion to Claify Deadline by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Beck, David)
August 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 69 Unopposed MOTION to Clarify Dispositive Motion Deadline by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Beck, David)
August 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 68 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by IP Innovation LLC, Technology Licensing Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Hall, Douglas)
August 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER appointing Michael T McLemore to the position of technical advisor in this case, with his costs to be assessed equally between pltf and defts and timely paid as billed. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/18/09. cc:attys 8-18-09(mll, )
August 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER granting 65 Motion for Extension of Time. Mr Mackinlay's deposition may be held on 8-27-09, after the currently scheduled close of claim construction discovery. Parties may file a supplemental joint claim construction statement to incorporate testimony from Mr Mackinlay's deposition after the deposition occurs and prior to the submission of Google's opening Markman brief. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/10/09. cc:attys 8-10-09(mll, )
August 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 65 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File for Claim Construction Discovery and Filing Supplemental Joint Claim Construction Statement by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Richardson, Michael)
August 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 64 Sealed Document. Defendant Google Inc's First Amended Answer, Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims (Beck, David) Modified on 8/4/2009 (ch, ).
July 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER denying 62 Motion for Extension of Time to File. As the parties did not submit the name of an agreed technical advisor, the Court is considering appointing Michael T. McLemore to the position. The Court ORDERS the parties tofile any objections they have to Mr. McLemore no later than August 7, 2009.. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 7/30/09. (ehs, )
July 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 62 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Motion to Extend Claim Construction Briefing Deadlines by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Beck, David)
July 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER - the Court CONTINUES the 7/29/09 hearing on Defendants motion to dismiss (Docket No. 50) to 9/2/09 at 9:30 a.m. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 7/27/09. (ch, )
July 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 60 NOTICE by Google, Inc. Joint Notice Regarding a Proposed Technical Advisor (Beck, David)
July 22, 2009 Opinion or Order E-NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 50 SEALED MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Standing : Motion Hearing set for 7/29/2009 at 10:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. (rlf, )
July 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER granting 58 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Deadline for filing amended pleadings is August 4,2009. All other future deadlines remain as set forth in the Court's June 6, 2008 Updated Docket Control Order as Modified by the Court's Order of May 4,2009. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 7/15/09. (ehs, )
July 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 58 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Motion to Extend Deadline for Amended Pleadings by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Beck, David)
July 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 57 JOINT CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF AND PREHEARING STATEMENT filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Richardson, Michael)
May 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting 55 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. The parties will identiff any expert witnesses expected to offer claim construction opinions in their July 13, 2009 Joint Statement without including a sunmary of each opinion to be offered by such experts at that time. Instead, Plaintiffs and Defendant will serve declarations setting forth each expert's claim construction opinions concurrently with their respective initial Markman Briefs and Supporting Evidence (August 24,2009 for Plaintiffs, and September 7,2009 for Defendant). The parties may conduct expert depositions concerning claim construction declarations after August 13, 2009 as long as they are completed by September 14,2009; the new deadline for serving rebuttal expert witness reports is December 16,2009; the new discovery deadline is January 15,2010; all other future deadlines remain as set forth in the Court's June 6, 2008 Updated Docket Control Order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 5/4/09. (ehs, )
May 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 55 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Joint Motion to Extend Certain Deadlines for Discovery and Rebuttal Expert Witness Reports by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Beck, David)
February 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 54 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 50 SEALED MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Standing filed by Google, Inc.. (Beck, David)
February 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 53 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 50 SEALED MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Standing filed by IP Innovation LLC, Technology Licensing Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Gibbons, Paul)
January 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting 51 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 50 SEALED MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Standing Responses due by 2/6/2009 Deadline for Google's reply brief is extended to 2/20/09 and Parties shall complete mediation by 4/16/09. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 1/20/09. (ch, )
January 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 51 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 50 SEALED MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Standing For leave To Amend Briefing Schedule And Deadline For Mediation by IP Innovation LLC, Technology Licensing Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hall, Douglas)
January 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 50 SEALED MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Standing by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Beck, David) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/6/2009: # 6 Text of Proposed Order) (sm, ).
November 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting 48 Motion to Amend date for completion of mediation. Deadline for completion of mediation extended to 1/31/09. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/7/08. (ehs, )
November 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 48 Agreed MOTION to Amend/Correct DATE FOR COMPLETION OF MEDIATION by IP Innovation LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gibbons, Paul)
October 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 47 NOTICE by Google, Inc. Notice of Compliance with Patent Rule 4-2 (Beck, David)
October 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 46 NOTICE by IP Innovation LLC, Technology Licensing Corporation Plaintiffs' Notice Of Compliance With Patent Rule 4-2 (Hall, Douglas)
October 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 45 NOTICE by IP Innovation LLC, Technology Licensing Corporation Plaintiffs' Notice of Compliance With Patent Rule 4-1 (Hall, Douglas)
October 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 44 NOTICE by Google, Inc. Notice of Compliance with Patent Rule 4-1 (Beck, David)
August 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 43 NOTICE by Google, Inc. Defendant Google Inc.'s Notice of Compliance with Patent Rules 3-3 and 3-4 (Beck, David)
August 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 42 Agreed PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 8/28/08. (ehs, )
August 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MOTION for Protective Order Joint Motion for Entry of Agreed Protective Order by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Agreed Protective Order)(Beck, David)
July 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 40 NOTICE by Google, Inc. Defendant Google Inc.'s Notice of Compliance with Initial Disclosure Requirements (Beck, David)
July 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 39 NOTICE of Disclosure by IP Innovation LLC, Technology Licensing Corporation (PR 3-1 and 3-2 Amended Initial Disclosures) (Ward, Thomas)
July 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting 37 Plaintiffs Motion to Amend/Correct their initial disclosures pursuant to Local Patent Rule 3-1 and 3-2. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 7/21/08. (ch, )
July 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MOTION to Amend/Correct Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion For Leave To Amend Their Initial Disclosures Pursuant To Patent Rules 3-1 And 3-2 by IP Innovation LLC, Technology Licensing Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Hall, Douglas) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/17/2008: # 3 Text of Proposed Order) (mpv, ).
June 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 36 NOTICE of Disclosure by IP Innovation LLC, Technology Licensing Corporation (Initial) (Ward, Thomas)
June 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 35 NOTICE of Disclosure by IP Innovation LLC, Technology Licensing Corporation of Service of PR 3-1 and 3-2 (Ward, Thomas)
June 6, 2008 Opinion or Order ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediator.*** "TWO PART DOCUMENT SEE DOCKET ENTRY # 34 DOCKET CONTROL ORDER Page #7*** Hesha Abrams added as Mediator. Mediation to be completed by 12/10/08. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 6/5/08. (ehs, ) Modified on 6/6/2008 (ehs, ).
June 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 34 DOCKET CONTROL ORDER - Amended Pleadings due by 7/16/2009., Discovery due by 1/5/2010., Markman Hearing set for 10/1/2009 09:30 AM in (Tyler) before Judge Leonard Davis., Motions in limine due by 3/15/2010., Proposed Pretrial Order due by 1/22/2010., Jury Selection set for 4/6/2010 09:00 AM in (Marshall) before Judge Leonard Davis., Jury Trial set for 4/12/2010 09:00 AM in (Marshall) before Judge Leonard Davis., Pretrial Conference set for 3/18/2010 09:00 AM in (Tyler) before Judge Leonard Davis. Mediation deadline 12/10/08. All other deadlines are set forth herein. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 6/5/08. (ch, )
June 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 33 DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 6/2/08. (ch, )
May 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 32 NOTICE by Google, Inc. of Filing of Proposed Discovery Order and Proposed Docket Control Order (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Discovery Order, # 2 Exhibit Proposed Docket Control Order)(Rogers, Elizabeth)
May 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 31 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Anna T Lee for Google, Inc. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 2-1-3822. (ch, )
May 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting 29 Motion to Withdraw. Karen L. Blouin is terminated as attorney of record for IP Innovation LLC and Technology Licensing Corp.. Signed by Judge Judge Leonard Davis on 5/19/08. (ch, )
May 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MOTION to Withdraw Karen L. Blouin as Counsel for IP Innovation LLC and Technology Licensing Corporation (UNOPPOSED) by IP Innovation LLC, Technology Licensing Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ward, Thomas)
May 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 28 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference, proposed Discovery Order and proposed dates for Docket Control Order. Parties appeared for their Status Conference on 5/5/08, met and confered and are excused from the requirement of filing a written proposed discovery plan in this case. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 5/15/08. (ehs, )
April 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 27 AMENDED ORDER - Status Conference set for 5/5/2008 01:30 PM before Judge Leonard Davis and Judge John D. Love. The purpose of the conference will be to assign a claim contruction hearing date and trial setting. The parties shall be prepared to inform the court whether they will consent to trial before Judge Love.. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 4/15/08. (ch, )
April 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER - This case is set for a status conference on May 8, 2008 at 1:30 p.m. before the Honorable Leonard E. Davis and the Honorable John D. Love in Judge Davis's Courtroom in Tyler, Texas. The purpose of the conference will be to assign a claim construction hearing date and trial setting. Attached its recently revised standard docket control and discovery orders tothis Order. These will not be discussed at the status conference, but the parties will be expected to meet, confer, and agree on the interim dates and discovery terms. If they cannot agree on a particular issue, they shall submit the orders, with disagreements noted. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 4/11/08. (ehs, )
April 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 25 RESPONSE to 22 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim Plaintiff's Reply To Defendant Google's Counterclaims by IP Innovation LLC, Technology Licensing Corporation. (Hall, Douglas)
March 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTICE by IP Innovation LLC, Technology Licensing Corporation re 4 Order, and Request for Scheduling Conference (Ward, Thomas)
March 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 23 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Google, Inc. identifying None as Corporate Parent. (Beck, David) Modified on 3/20/2008 (mpv, ).
March 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Defendant Google Inc.'s Answer, Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims ANSWER to Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against IP Innovation LLC, Technology Licensing Corporation by Google, Inc..(Beck, David)
February 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 21 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Victor F Souto for Google, Inc. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 6-1-12719. (ch, )
February 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 20 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Elizabeth I Rogers for Google, Inc. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 6-1-12719. (ch, )
February 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 19 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Mark G Matuschak for Google, Inc. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 6-1-12719. (ch, )
February 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 18 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney John M Hintz for Google, Inc. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 6-1-12719. (ch, )
February 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 17 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Richard A Goldenberg for Google, Inc. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 6-1-12719. (ch, )
February 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 16 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Ross E Firsenbaum for Google, Inc. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 6-1-12719. (ch, )
February 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 15 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Karen L Blouin for IP Innovation LLC and Technology Licensing Corporation. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 2-1-3489 (ch, )
January 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Ernest Richardson on behalf of Google, Inc. (Richardson, Michael)
January 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Answer Due Deadline Updated for Google, Inc. to 3/20/2008. (ch, )
January 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting 12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Google's deadline is extended to 3/20/08. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 1/28/08. (ch, )
January 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Original Complaint for Patent Infringement by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Original Complaint for Patent Infringement)(Beck, David)
January 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 11 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by IP Innovation LLC, Technology Licensing Corporation. Google, Inc. served on 1/17/2008, answer due 2/6/2008. (ehs, )
January 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 10 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney David J Mahalek for IP Innovation LLC and Technology Licensing Corporation. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 6-1-12495 (ch, )
January 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 9 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Douglas M Hall for IP Innovation LLC and Technology Licensing Corporation. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 6-1-12495 (ch, )
January 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 8 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Arthur A Gasey for IP Innovation LLC and Technology Licensing Corporation. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 6-1-12495 (ch, )
January 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 7 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Paul C Gibbons for IP Innovation LLC and Technology Licensing Corporation. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 6-1-12495 (ch, )
January 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 6 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Joseph N Hosteny for IP Innovation LLC and Technology Licensing Corporation. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 6-1-12495 (ch, )
January 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 5 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Raymond P Niro for IP Innovation LLC and Technology Licensing Corporation. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 6-1-12495 (ch, )
January 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER - the court orders that Plaintiff to file a notice that the case is ready for scheduling conference when all dfts have either answered or filed a motion to transfer or dismiss. The notice shall be filed within five days of the last remaining dfts answer or motion. The notice shall include a list of any pending motions to dismiss or transfer. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 1/10/08. (ch, )
November 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric M. Albritton on behalf of IP Innovation LLC, Technology Licensing Corporation (Albritton, Eric)
November 16, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: # 1 Form AO 120)(Ward, Thomas)
November 16, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Google, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 1335423.), filed by IP Innovation LLC, Technology Licensing Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Civil Cover Sheet # 6)(Ward, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IP Innovation LLC et al v. Google, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IP Innovation LLC
Represented By: Thomas John Ward, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Technology Licensing Corporation
Represented By: Thomas John Ward, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google, Inc.
Represented By: Victor F Souto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?