March 5, 2008 |
Filing 60
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Vinita Ferrera for YouTube, LLC. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 2-1-3566(ch, )
|
March 5, 2008 |
Filing 59
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Christine E Duh for YouTube, LLC and Google, Inc. (APPROVED) (FEE PAID) 2-1-3566. (ch, )
|
March 3, 2008 |
Filing 58
RESPONSE to 37 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of The Dallas Morning News, Inc. by Beneficial Innovations, Inc.. (Adams, Julien)
|
March 3, 2008 |
Filing 57
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Morris Communications Company, LLC identifying Morris Communications Holding Company LLC and Shivers Trading & Operating Company as Corporate Parents. (Jones, Michael) Modified on 3/3/2008 (mpv, ).
|
March 3, 2008 |
Filing 56
ANSWER to Complaint and, COUNTERCLAIM against Beneficial Innovations, Inc. by Morris Communications Company, LLC.(Jones, Michael)
|
February 28, 2008 |
Filing 55
ORDER granting 54 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Tribune Interactive, Inc. deadline is 3/12/08. Signed by Judge Charles Everingham on 2/28/08. (ch, )
|
February 28, 2008 |
Answer Due Deadline Updated for Tribune Interactive, Inc. to 3/12/2008. (ch, )
|
February 27, 2008 |
Filing 54
Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Tribune Interactive, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1)(Smith, Michael)
|
February 21, 2008 |
Filing 53
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Kevin C May for AOL, LLC. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 2-1-3524. (ch, ) Modified on 2/25/2008 (ch, ).
|
February 21, 2008 |
Filing 52
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Tigran Vardanian for AOL, LLC.. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 2-1-3524(ch, )
|
February 21, 2008 |
Filing 51
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney David S Foster for AOL, LLC. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 2-1-3524. (ch, )
|
February 14, 2008 |
Filing 50
ORDER granting 41 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Yahoo!, Inc. deadline is extended to 3/12/08. Signed by Judge Charles Everingham on 2/14/08. (ch, )
|
February 14, 2008 |
Filing 49
ORDER granting 45 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Tribune Interactive Inc. deadline is extended to 2/28/08. Signed by Judge Charles Everingham on 2/14/08. (ch, )
|
February 14, 2008 |
Filing 48
ORDER granting 43 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. AOL. LLC deadline is extended to 3/12/08. Signed by Judge Charles Everingham on 2/14/08. (ch, )
|
February 14, 2008 |
Answer Due Deadline Updated for AOL, LLC. to 3/12/2008. (ch, )
|
February 14, 2008 |
Answer Due Deadline Updated for Tribune Interactive, Inc. to 2/28/2008. (ch, )
|
February 13, 2008 |
Filing 47
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Edwin Jones on behalf of Yahoo! Inc. (Jones, Michael)
|
February 13, 2008 |
Filing 46
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Edwin Jones on behalf of AOL, LLC. (Jones, Michael)
|
February 12, 2008 |
***FILED IN ERROR. Document #, Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Yahoo! Inc. to 3/12/2008. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension. PLEASE IGNORE. Clerical error, not the first application and more time than clerk is allowed to give.*** (mpv, )
|
February 12, 2008 |
***FILED IN ERROR; PLEASE IGNORE***Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Yahoo! Inc. to 3/12/2008. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mpv, ) Modified on 2/12/2008 (mpv, ).
|
February 11, 2008 |
Filing 45
Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or otherwise respond by Tribune Interactive, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Michael)
|
February 11, 2008 |
Filing 44
Defendants Google Inc.'s and YouTube, LLC's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against Beneficial Innovations, Inc. by YouTube, LLC, Google, Inc..(Smith, Melissa)
|
February 11, 2008 |
Filing 43
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by AOL, LLC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeVasto, Diane)
|
February 11, 2008 |
Filing 42
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by YouTube, LLC, Google, Inc. identifying None as Corporate Parent. (Smith, Melissa)
|
February 11, 2008 |
Filing 41
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bufe, John)
|
February 8, 2008 |
Filing 40
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kelley Anne Conaty on behalf of The Dallas Morning News, Inc. (Conaty, Kelley)
|
February 8, 2008 |
Filing 39
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven Charles Malin on behalf of The Dallas Morning News, Inc. (Malin, Steven)
|
February 8, 2008 |
Filing 38
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by The Dallas Morning News, Inc. identifying A.H. Belo Corporation as Corporate Parent. (Medlock, Virgil)
|
February 8, 2008 |
Filing 37
ANSWER to Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against AOL, LLC. by The Dallas Morning News, Inc..(Medlock, Virgil)
|
February 8, 2008 |
Filing 36
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Julien Antonio Adams on behalf of Beneficial Innovations, Inc. (Adams, Julien)
|
February 8, 2008 |
Filing 35
ORDER granting 34 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Morris Communications Company LLC deadline is extended to 3/3/08. Signed by Judge Charles Everingham on 2/8/08. (ch, )
|
February 8, 2008 |
Answer Due Deadline Updated for Morris Communications Company, LLC to 3/3/2008. (ch, )
|
February 7, 2008 |
Filing 34
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, of Morris Communications Company, LLC by Beneficial Innovations, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Charles)
|
January 30, 2008 |
Filing 33
E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Beneficial Innovations, Inc.. Morris Communications Company, LLC served on 12/21/2007. (ch, )
|
January 17, 2008 |
Filing 32
ORDER granting 31 Motion to Dismiss. Claims asserted by Plaintiff against Dft IGN Entertainment, Inc. should be dismissed with prejudice, with all attorney fee's and costs of court being borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 1/17/8. (ch, )
|
January 15, 2008 |
Filing 31
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss IGN Entertainment, Inc. with Prejudice by Beneficial Innovations, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Abernathy, Nancy)
|
January 15, 2008 |
Filing 30
E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Beneficial Innovations, Inc.. YouTube, LLC served on 12/21/2007, answer due 2/11/2008. (ehs, )
|
January 15, 2008 |
Filing 29
E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Beneficial Innovations, Inc.. Tribune Interactive, Inc. served on 12/21/2007, answer due 1/10/2008. (ehs, )
|
January 15, 2008 |
Filing 28
E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Beneficial Innovations, Inc.. IGN Entertainment, Inc. served on 12/21/2007, answer due 1/10/2008. (ehs, )
|
January 15, 2008 |
Filing 27
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Franklin Jones, Jr on behalf of Beneficial Innovations, Inc. (Jones, Franklin)
|
January 11, 2008 |
Filing 26
ORDER granting 23 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Tribune Interactive Inc. deadline is extended to 2/11/08. Signed by Judge Charles Everingham on 1/10/08. (ch, )
|
January 10, 2008 |
Filing 25
ORDER granting 24 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Morris Communicationd Company LLC deadline is extended to 2/11/08. Signed by Judge Charles Everingham on 1/10/08. (ch, )
|
January 10, 2008 |
Answer Due Deadline Updated for Morris Communications Company, LLC to 2/11/2008. (ch, )
|
January 9, 2008 |
Filing 24
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, on behalf of Morris Communications Company, LLC by Beneficial Innovations, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Charles)
|
January 9, 2008 |
Filing 23
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, Unopposed by Tribune Interactive, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Michael)
|
January 9, 2008 |
Filing 22
ORDER granting 12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. AOL, LLC deadline is extended to 2/11/08. Signed by Judge Charles Everingham on 1/9/08. (ch, )
|
January 9, 2008 |
Filing 21
ORDER granting 14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Yahoo's, Inc. deadline is extended to 2/11/08. Signed by Judge Charles Everingham on 1/9/08. (ch, )
|
January 9, 2008 |
Filing 20
ORDER granting 15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Google, Inc. deadline is extended to 2/11/08. Signed by Judge Charles Everingham on 1/9/08. (ch, )
|
January 9, 2008 |
Filing 19
ORDER granting 16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. YouTube, LLC. deadline is extended to 2/11/08. Signed by Judge Charles Everingham on 1/9/08. (ch, )
|
January 9, 2008 |
Filing 18
ORDER granting 17 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The Dallas Morning News, Inc. deadline is extended to 2/11/08. Signed by Judge Charles Everingham on 1/9/08. (ch, )
|
January 9, 2008 |
Answer Due Deadline Updated for Google, Inc. to 2/11/2008. (ch, )
|
January 9, 2008 |
Answer Due Deadline Updated for AOL, LLC. to 2/11/2008. (ch, )
|
January 9, 2008 |
Answer Due Deadline Updated for The Dallas Morning News, Inc. to 2/11/2008. (ch, )
|
January 9, 2008 |
Answer Due Deadline Updated for YouTube, LLC to 2/11/2008. (ch, )
|
January 9, 2008 |
Answer Due Deadline Updated for Yahoo! Inc. to 2/11/2008. (ch, )
|
January 8, 2008 |
Filing 17
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, [Unopposed] by The Dallas Morning News, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
|
January 8, 2008 |
Filing 16
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Defendant YouTube, LLC's Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff Beneficial Innovations, Inc.'s Complaint by YouTube, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
|
January 8, 2008 |
Filing 15
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Defendant Google Inc.'s Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff Beneficial Innovations, Inc.'s Complaint by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
|
January 8, 2008 |
Filing 14
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, (Agreed Motion for Extension of Time for Yahoo! Inc. to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Original Complaint) by Beneficial Innovations, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Abernathy, Nancy)
|
January 8, 2008 |
Filing 13
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nancy Claire Abernathy on behalf of Beneficial Innovations, Inc. (Abernathy, Nancy)
|
January 8, 2008 |
Filing 12
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, of Defendant AOL LLC by Beneficial Innovations, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Charles)
|
January 3, 2008 |
Filing 9
E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Beneficial Innovations, Inc.. Google, Inc. served on 12/21/2007, answer due 1/10/2008. (ch, )
|
January 3, 2008 |
Filing 8
E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Beneficial Innovations, Inc.. AOL, LLC. served on 12/21/2007, answer due 1/10/2008. (ch, )
|
January 2, 2008 |
Filing 11
E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Beneficial Innovations, Inc.. The Dallas Morning News, Inc. served on 12/21/2007, answer due 1/10/2008. (ch, )
|
January 2, 2008 |
Filing 10
E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Beneficial Innovations, Inc.. Yahoo! Inc. served on 12/21/2007, answer due 1/10/2008. (ch, )
|
December 27, 2007 |
Filing 7
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Elizabeth L DeRieux on behalf of Beneficial Innovations, Inc. (DeRieux, Elizabeth)
|
December 27, 2007 |
Filing 6
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sidney Calvin Capshaw, III on behalf of Beneficial Innovations, Inc. (Capshaw, Sidney)
|
December 20, 2007 |
Filing 5
Magistrate Consent Form Mailed to Beneficial Innovations, Inc. (ch, )
|
December 20, 2007 |
Filing 4
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham. Signed by Judge Charles Everingham on 12/20/07. (ch, )
|
December 20, 2007 |
Filing 3
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Beneficial Innovations, Inc. identifying None as Corporate Parent. (Ainsworth, Charles)
|
December 20, 2007 |
Filing 2
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Ainsworth, Charles)
|
December 20, 2007 |
Filing 1
COMPLAINT For Patent Infringement against all defendants ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 1373109.), filed by Beneficial Innovations, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Patent# 2 Exhibit B - Patent# 3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ainsworth, Charles)
|
December 20, 2007 |
E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Morris Communications Company, LLC, Tribune Interactive, Inc., Yahoo! Inc., YouTube, LLC, AOL, LLC., The Dallas Morning News, Inc., Google, Inc., IGN Entertainment, Inc.. (ch, )
|
December 20, 2007 |
E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Yahoo! Inc. registered agent. (ch, )
|