Retractable Technologies, Inc. v. Becton Dickinson and Company
Plaintiff: Retractable Technologies, Inc.
Defendant: Becton Dickinson and Company
Case Number: 2:2008cv00016
Filed: January 18, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Marshall Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: David Folsom
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:15 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 757 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re 751 MOTION to Alter Judgment Plaintiffs' Motion to Alter or Amend the Judgment filed by Thomas J Shaw, Retractable Technologies, Inc.. Plaintiffs Motion to Alter or Amend the Judgment (Dkt. #751) is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 10/27/2017. (cm, )
September 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 552 MEMORANDUM ORDER. Defendant Becton Dickinson has failed to show that the Order denying BD's Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Plaintiff's Expert Robert Maness was clearly erroneous and contrary to law. Thus, BD's Objections 545 are OVERRULED and the Court adopts the Order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/11/13. (mll, )
September 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 544 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 474 Report and Recommendations and denying 372 Sealed Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Patent Infringement as an Antitrust Violation filed by Becton Dickinson and Company. The Court additionally denies 507 Sealed Motion in Limine, filed by Becton Dickinson and Company, for the reasons set forth in this Order and in the Magistrate Judges Order 481 . Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 9/9/13. (mjc, )
September 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 537 MEMORANDUM ORDER - Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 9/6/2013. (ch, )
August 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 513 MEMORANDUM ORDER - Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 8/26/2013. (ch, )
August 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 497 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 368 Report and Recommendations, denying 178 Sealed Patent Motion, filed by Becton Dickinson and Company. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 8/16/13. (ehs, )
August 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 488 MEMORANDUM ORDER granting, denying and granting in part - denying in part motions in Limine, ruling set forth herein. Motions terminated: 426 SEALED MOTION IN LIMINE filed by Becton Dickinson and Company, 421 SEALED MOTION Plaintiffs' Motions in Limine filed by Thomas J Shaw, Retractable Technologies, Inc... Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 8/14/13. (ehs, )
August 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 481 MEMORANDUM ORDER - granting in part - denying in part # 419 , denying # 420 and #[423} motions in Limine. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 8-12-13. (ehs, )
April 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 399 MEMORANDUM ORDER. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 4/16/2013. (ch, )
March 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 379 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 343 Report and Recommendations, denying 171 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Becton Dickinson and Company. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 3/26/13. (bas, )
February 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 347 MEMORANDUM ORDER - Courts overruled all of BDs objections to Dr. Scotts opinions and anticipated testimony, BDs Motion to Preclude the Expert Testimony of Carol A. Scott is hereby DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 2/27/13. (ehs, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Retractable Technologies, Inc. v. Becton Dickinson and Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Retractable Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen David Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Becton Dickinson and Company
Represented By: Jacqueline Pilar Rubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?