Harris v. Blockbuster, Inc. Featured Case
Plaintiff: Cathryn Elaine Harris
Defendant: Blockbuster, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2008cv00155
Filed: April 9, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Other Statutory Actions Office
County: Anderson
Presiding Judge: David Folsom
Presiding Judge:
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 2, 2010. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2009 Filing 31 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT as to Case Transferred Out - District Transfer received case transferred on 2/3/09 and assigned 3:09cv217. (ehs, )
January 30, 2009 Interdistrict transfer to the Northern District of Texas Dallas Division. Certified copy of transfer order, docket sheet and complaint mailed to the ND/TX, Dallas Division (ehs, )
December 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting 27 Motion to Change Venue. For the foregoing reasons, Dft's Motion to Transfer Venue is Granted. This case is hereby TRANSFERRED to the Northern District of Texas, Dallas Division. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 12/30/08. (ch, )
December 17, 2008 Filing 29 REPLY to Response to Motion re 27 Second MOTION to Change Venue filed by Blockbuster, Inc.. (Brame, Frank)
December 10, 2008 Filing 28 RESPONSE in Opposition re 27 Second MOTION to Change Venue filed by Cathryn Elaine Harris. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Wilson, Jeremy)
November 26, 2008 Filing 27 Second MOTION to Change Venue by Blockbuster, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Ryan Miller, # 2 Affidavit Declaration of Frank Brame, # 3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion)(Brame, Frank)
November 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER dismissing without prejudice 8 Motion to Change Venue. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 11/14/08. (mrm, )
October 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting 20 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Defendants Reply to Plaintiffs Response to Defendants Motion to Compel Individual Arbitration may contain up to, but shall not exceed ten pages, excluding attachments. Plaintiffs Surreply to Defendants Reply may contain up to, but shall not exceed ten pages, excludingattachments. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 10/7/08. (ch, )
October 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting 22 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 10/7/08. (ch, )
October 3, 2008 Filing 23 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 15 MOTION to Compel Individual Arbitration filed by Cathryn Elaine Harris. (Wilson, Jeremy)
September 26, 2008 Filing 22 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Extension for Sur-Reply by Cathryn Elaine Harris. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Extension)(Wilson, Jeremy) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/30/2008: # 2 Revised Proposed Order) (mpv, ).
September 19, 2008 Filing 21 REPLY to Response to Motion re 15 MOTION to Compel Individual Arbitration filed by Blockbuster, Inc.. (Brame, Frank)
September 19, 2008 Filing 20 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Cathryn Elaine Harris, Blockbuster, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brame, Frank)
September 5, 2008 Filing 19 RESPONSE to Motion re 15 MOTION to Compel Individual Arbitration filed by Cathryn Elaine Harris. (Wilson, Jeremy)
August 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting 17 Agreed Motion for Briefing Schedule. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 8/18/08. (ch, )
August 14, 2008 Filing 17 MOTION Briefing Schedule by Cathryn Elaine Harris. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wilson, Jeremy)
July 31, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/5/2009 before Judge David Folsom. Amended Pleadings due by 3/1/2009. Discovery due by 7/2/2009. Joinder of Parties due by 3/1/2009. Mediation Completion due by 8/3/2009. Dispositive Motions due by 8/3/2009. JOINT Proposed Pretrial Order due by 9/18/2009.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 7/31/2008. (sm, )
July 30, 2008 Filing 15 MOTION to Compel Individual Arbitration by Blockbuster, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Dineen, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Raiff, Michael)
July 30, 2008 Filing 14 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Raiff, Michael)
July 24, 2008 Filing 13 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 8 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Cathryn Elaine Harris. (Wilson, Jeremy)
July 14, 2008 Filing 12 REPLY to Response to Motion re 8 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Blockbuster, Inc.. (Brame, Frank)
July 2, 2008 Filing 11 RESPONSE to Motion re 8 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Cathryn Elaine Harris. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Wilson, Jeremy)
June 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER TO CONDUCT RULE 26(f) CONFERENCE, ( Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/30/2008.). Signed by Judge David Folsom on 6/18/08. (mrm, )
June 18, 2008 ***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 9, Additional Attachments to Main Document: 8 MOTION to Change Venue. PLEASE IGNORE. Proposed Order now attached to #8 Motion by clerk.*** (mpv, )
June 18, 2008 Magistrate Consent Form eMailed to Blockbuster, Inc. (mpv, )
June 17, 2008 Filing 9 ***FILED IN ERROR; PLEASE IGNORE; PROPOSED ORDER NOW ATTACHED TO MOTION # 8 ***Additional Attachments to Main Document: 8 MOTION to Change Venue.. (Raiff, Michael) Modified on 6/18/2008 (mpv, ).
June 17, 2008 Filing 8 MOTION to Change Venue by Blockbuster, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Ryan Miller, # 2 Affidavit Frank Brame)(Raiff, Michael) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/18/2008: # 3 Text of Proposed Order) (mpv, ).
June 17, 2008 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Blockbuster, Inc. identifying None as Corporate Parent. (Raiff, Michael) Modified on 6/18/2008 (mpv, ).
June 17, 2008 Filing 6 Original ANSWER to 5 Amended Complaint by Blockbuster, Inc..(Raiff, Michael)
June 3, 2008 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT - CLASS ACTION against Blockbuster, Inc., filed by Cathryn Elaine Harris.(Wilson, Jeremy)
May 12, 2008 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James Mark Mann on behalf of all plaintiffs (Mann, James)
April 30, 2008 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Blockbuster, Inc. to 6/4/2008. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mpv, )
April 30, 2008 Filing 3 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Blockbuster, Inc..( Raiff, Michael)
April 9, 2008 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Blockbuster, Inc.. (ch, )
April 9, 2008 Filing 2 Magistrate Consent Form Mailed to Cathryn Elaine Harris (ch, )
April 9, 2008 Case Assigned to Judge David Folsom. (ch, )
April 9, 2008 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against all defendants ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 1496366.), filed by Cathryn Elaine Harris. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wilson, Jeremy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. Blockbuster, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cathryn Elaine Harris
Represented By: Jeremy Reade Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blockbuster, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?