Convolve, Inc. v. Dell Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Convolve, Inc.
Defendant: Western Digital Corporation, Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc., Dell Inc. and Hitachi Ltd.
Not Classified By Court: Robert W Faulkner
Case Number: 2:2008cv00244
Filed: June 18, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Patent Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Roy S Payne
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 145
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 772 ORDER of USCA-FEDERAL CIRCUIT dismissing the appeals as to #753 Notice of Appeal - FEDERAL CIRCUIT filed by Convolve, Inc., #683 Notice of Appeal - FEDERAL CIRCUIT filed by Dell Inc. Issued as Mandate: February 13, 2018. (dlc, )
February 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 771 ORDER re #770 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Convolve, Inc., Dell Inc., Dell Inc. and Dell Inc. terminated., Attorney Bradley Bowling; Deron R Dacus; Roger Joseph Fulghum; Marcus T Hall; Jeffrey G. Homrig; Joshua J Parker; Gene C Schaerr; Michael Charles Smith; Kimball R Anderson and Kathleen B Barry terminated.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 2/8/2018. (nkl, )
February 8, 2018 Filing 770 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Claims Against and By Dell by Convolve, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Joly, Brenda)
February 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 769 ORDER of USCA-FEDERAL CIRCUIT dismissing the appeals as to #685 Notice of Appeal - FEDERAL CIRCUIT filed by Western Digital Corporation, #684 Notice of Appeal - FEDERAL CIRCUIT filed by Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc., Hitachi Ltd. The revised official caption for the remaining appeals, Nos. 2015-1452, and 2017-2335, is reflected. Issued as Mandate: February 6, 2018. (dlc, )
February 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 768 ORDER granting #767 Stipulation of Dismissal of Claims with prejudice as too Hitachi Ltd., Western Digital Corporation, Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 2/2/18. (ch, )
February 1, 2018 Filing 767 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Claims Against and By HGST, Hitachi and Western Digital by Convolve, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Joly, Brenda) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/1/2018: #2 Revised Proposed Order) (nkl, ).
December 28, 2017 Filing 766 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT on 12/28/17 by USCA-FEDERAL CIRCUIT as to #765 Amended Notice of Cross Appeal - PATENT CASE, #746 Memorandum & Opinion, #758 Judgment, and certified copy of Docket Sheet. (dlc, )
December 28, 2017 Transmission of Amended Notice of Cross-Appeal, #758 Second Amended Judgment, #746 Memorandum Opinion, and certified copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit by separate email. re #765 Amended Notice of Cross Appeal - FEDERAL CIRCUIT (dlc, )
December 27, 2017 Filing 765 AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL - PATENT CASE as to #753 Notice of Appeal - FEDERAL CIRCUIT by Convolve, Inc. (Albritton, Eric)
December 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 764 ORDER of USCA-FEDERAL CIRCUIT, the appeals are reactivated as to #685 Notice of Appeal - FEDERAL CIRCUIT filed by Western Digital Corporation, #753 Notice of Appeal - FEDERAL CIRCUIT filed by Convolve, Inc., #683 Notice of Appeal - FEDERAL CIRCUIT filed by Dell Inc., #684 Notice of Appeal - FEDERAL CIRCUIT filed by Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc. Appellants' opening briefs are due within 60 days of the date of this order. Entered: December 20, 2017. (dlc, )
December 13, 2017 Filing 763 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT on 12/13/17 by USCA-FEDERAL CIRCUIT as to #760 Amended Notice of Appeal - PATENT CASE, #762 Amended Notice of Appeal - PATENT CASE, #758 Judgment, #761 Amended Notice of Appeal - PATENT CASE and certified copy of Docket Sheet. (dlc, )
December 13, 2017 Filing 762 AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL - PATENT CASE as to #683 Notice of Appeal - FEDERAL CIRCUIT by Dell Inc. (Fulghum, Roger)
December 13, 2017 Filing 761 AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL - PATENT CASE as to #684 Notice of Appeal - FEDERAL CIRCUIT by Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc., Hitachi Ltd. (Findlay, Eric)
December 13, 2017 Filing 760 AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL - PATENT CASE as to #685 Notice of Appeal - FEDERAL CIRCUIT by Western Digital Corporation (Findlay, Eric)
December 13, 2017 Transmission of Amended Notices of Appeal, #758 Amended Judgment and Certified copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit by separate email. re #760 Amended Notice of Appeal - FEDERAL CIRCUIT, #761 Amended Notice of Appeal - FEDERAL CIRCUIT, #762 Amended Notice of Appeal - FEDERAL CIRCUIT (dlc, )
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 759 ORDER re Costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 11/13/2017. (nkl, )
November 13, 2017 Filing 758 SECOND AMENDED JUDGMENT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 11/13/2017. (nkl, )
August 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 757 ORDER of USCA-FEDERAL CIRCUIT deactivating the appeal as to #753 Notice of Appeal - FEDERAL CIRCUIT filed by Convolve, Inc. The parties are directed to inform this court within 30 days of entry by the district court of an appealable judgment. Issued: August 1, 2017. (dlc, )
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 756 ORDER of USCA-FEDERAL CIRCUIT deactivating these appeals as to #685 Notice of Appeal - FEDERAL CIRCUIT filed by Western Digital Corporation, #683 Notice of Appeal - FEDERAL CIRCUIT filed by Dell Inc., #684 Notice of Appeal - FEDERAL CIRCUIT filed by Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc., Hitachi Ltd. Issued: July 25, 2017 (dlc, )
July 24, 2017 Filing 755 NOTICE of Docketing Notice of Appeal from USCA-FEDERAL CIRCUIT re #753 Notice of Appeal - FEDERAL CIRCUIT filed by Convolve, Inc. USCA-Federal Circuit Case Number 17-2335 (dlc, )
July 21, 2017 Filing 754 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by USCA-FEDERAL CIRCUIT as to #746 Memorandum & Opinion, #753 Notice of Appeal - FEDERAL CIRCUIT, #747 Amended Judgment, and certified copy of Docket Sheet. (dlc, )
July 21, 2017 Filing 753 NOTICE OF APPEAL - FEDERAL CIRCUIT by Convolve, Inc.. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0540-6391422. (Albritton, Eric)
July 21, 2017 Transmission of Notice of Appeal, #747 Amended Judgment, #746 Memorandum Opinion and certified copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit by separate email. re #753 Notice of Appeal - FEDERAL CIRCUIT (dlc, )
July 7, 2017 Filing 752 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by USCA-Federal Circuit as to #747 Amended Judgment, #750 Amended Notice of Appeal - PATENT CASE, #749 Amended Notice of Appeal - PATENT CASE, #751 Amended Notice of Appeal - PATENT CASE, and certified copy of Docket Sheet. (dlc, )
July 7, 2017 Filing 751 AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL - PATENT CASE as to #684 Notice of Appeal - FEDERAL CIRCUIT by Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc., Hitachi Ltd. (Findlay, Eric)
July 7, 2017 Filing 750 AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL - PATENT CASE as to #685 Notice of Appeal - FEDERAL CIRCUIT by Western Digital Corporation (Findlay, Eric)
July 7, 2017 Filing 749 AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL - PATENT CASE as to #683 Notice of Appeal - FEDERAL CIRCUIT by Dell Inc. (Fulghum, Roger)
July 7, 2017 Transmission of Two Amended Notice of Appeals, #747 Amended Judgment and certified copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit by separate email. re #749 Amended Notice of Appeal - FEDERAL CIRCUIT, #751 Amended Notice of Appeal - FEDERAL CIRCUIT (dlc, ) Modified on 7/7/2017 (dlc, ).
July 7, 2017 Transmission of Amended Notice of Appeal, #747 Amended Judgment and certified copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit by separate email. re #750 Amended Notice of Appeal - FEDERAL CIRCUIT (dlc, )
June 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 748 ORDER of USCA reactivating the appeals as to #685 Notice of Appeal - FEDERAL CIRCUIT filed by Western Digital Corporation, #683 Notice of Appeal - FEDERAL CIRCUIT filed by Dell Inc., #684 Notice of Appeal - FEDERAL CIRCUIT filed by Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc., Hitachi Ltd. Appellants' opening briefs are due within 60 days of the date of this order. Issued: June 29, 2017. (dlc, )
June 8, 2017 Filing 747 AMENDED JUDGMENT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 06/08/2017. (nkl, )
June 7, 2017 Filing 746 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 06/07/2017. (nkl, )
January 19, 2017 Filing 745 RESPONSE to #743 Order on Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Brief Opposing Convolve's Motion for Reconsideration of the Final Judgment, to Amend the Final Judgment Pursuant to Rule 59(e), and for Additional and Amended Findings Pursuant to Rule 52(b) (Dkt. No. 698) (As Enhanced Damages) filed by Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc., Hitachi Ltd., Western Digital Corporation. (Findlay, Eric)
January 11, 2017 Filing 744 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Brenda L Joly on behalf of Convolve, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-6107286. (Joly, Brenda)
January 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 743 ORDER granting #731 Motion for Leave to File a Supplemental Brief on the Hard Disk Drive Defendants' Rule 60 Motion (as to Willful Infringement). Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 1/7/2017. (nkl, )
January 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 742 ORDER granting #729 Motion for Leave to File a Supplemental Brief to Convolves Motion for Reconsideration of the Final Judgment, to Amend the Final Judgment Pursuant to Rule 59(e), and for Additional and Amended Findings Pursuant to Rule 52(b) (Dkt. 698) (as to Enhanced Damages). Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 1/7/2017. (nkl, )
August 8, 2016 Filing 741 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #729 MOTION for Leave to File a Supplemental Brief to Convolve's Motion for Reconsideration of the Final Judgment, to Amend the Final Judgment Pursuant to Rule 59(e), and for Additional and Amended Findings Pursuant to Rule 52(b) (Dkt. 698) (as to Enhanced Damages) filed by Dell Inc., Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc., Hitachi Ltd., Western Digital Corporation. (Fulghum, Roger)
July 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 740 ORDER granting #739 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Anna Carr Halsey terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 7/29/2016. (nkl, )
July 28, 2016 Filing 739 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Anna C. Hasley by Convolve, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Albritton, Eric)
July 28, 2016 Filing 738 RESPONSE to Motion re #731 MOTION for Leave to File a Supplemental Brief on the Hard Disk Drive Defendants' Rule 60 Motion (as to Willful Infringement) filed by Convolve, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Albritton, Eric)
July 28, 2016 Filing 737 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #698 Opposed SEALED MOTION Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration of the Final Judgment, to Amend the Final Judgment Pursuant to Rule 59(e), and for Additional and Amended Findings Pursuant to Rule 52(b) (Docket No. 696) filed by Convolve, Inc.. (Albritton, Eric)
July 18, 2016 Filing 736 RESPONSE to Motion re #731 MOTION for Leave to File a Supplemental Brief on the Hard Disk Drive Defendants' Rule 60 Motion (as to Willful Infringement) filed by Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc., Hitachi Ltd., Western Digital Corporation. (Findlay, Eric)
July 18, 2016 Filing 735 RESPONSE to Motion re #729 MOTION for Leave to File a Supplemental Brief to Convolve's Motion for Reconsideration of the Final Judgment, to Amend the Final Judgment Pursuant to Rule 59(e), and for Additional and Amended Findings Pursuant to Rule 52(b) (Dkt. 698) (as to Enhanced Damages filed by Dell Inc., Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc., Hitachi Ltd., Western Digital Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fulghum, Roger)
July 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 734 ORDER granting #733 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Stephen E. Edwards terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 7/13/16. (mrm, )
July 8, 2016 Filing 733 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Stephen E. Edwards by Convolve, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Edwards, Stephen)
June 29, 2016 Filing 732 BRIEF filed Supplemental Brief on the Hard Disk Drive Defendants' Rule 60 Motion (as to Willful Infringement) (Dkt. 720) by Convolve, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Albritton, Eric)
June 29, 2016 Filing 731 MOTION for Leave to File a Supplemental Brief on the Hard Disk Drive Defendants' Rule 60 Motion (as to Willful Infringement) by Convolve, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Albritton, Eric)
June 29, 2016 Filing 730 BRIEF filed Supplemental Brief to Convolve's Motion for Reconsideration of the Final Judgment, to Amend the Final Judgment Pursuant to Rule 59(e), and for Additional and Amended Findings Pursuant to Rule 52(d) (dkt. 698) (as to Enhanced Damages) by Convolve, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Albritton, Eric)
June 29, 2016 Filing 729 MOTION for Leave to File a Supplemental Brief to Convolve's Motion for Reconsideration of the Final Judgment, to Amend the Final Judgment Pursuant to Rule 59(e), and for Additional and Amended Findings Pursuant to Rule 52(b) (Dkt. 698) (as to Enhanced Damages) by Convolve, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Albritton, Eric)
June 27, 2016 Filing 728 NOTICE by Dell Inc., Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc., Hitachi Ltd., Western Digital Corporation of Supplemental Authority (Barry, Kathleen)
May 31, 2016 Filing 727 SEALED SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #720 SEALED MOTION for Relief from Judgment Pursuant to FRCP 60(b)(6) filed by Convolve, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 18, #2 Exhibit 19, #3 Exhibit 20, #4 Exhibit 21, #5 Exhibit 22, #6 Exhibit 23)(Albritton, Eric)
May 19, 2016 Filing 726 SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re #720 SEALED MOTION for Relief from Judgment Pursuant to FRCP 60(b)(6) filed by Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc., Hitachi Ltd., Western Digital Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Findlay, Eric)
May 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 725 ORDER granting #724 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #720 SEALED MOTION for Relief from Judgment Pursuant to FRCP 60(b)(6) Replies due by 5/19/2016.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 05/13/2016. (nkl, )
April 29, 2016 Filing 724 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #720 SEALED MOTION for Relief from Judgment Pursuant to FRCP 60(b)(6) by Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc., Hitachi Ltd., Western Digital Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric)
April 25, 2016 Filing 723 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #720 SEALED MOTION for Relief from Judgment Pursuant to FRCP 60(b)(6) filed by Convolve, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Text of Proposed Order)(Albritton, Eric)
April 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 722 ORDER granting #721 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #720 SEALED MOTION for Relief from Judgment Pursuant to FRCP 60(b)(6) Responses due by 4/25/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 04/07/2016. (nkl, )
April 6, 2016 Filing 721 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #720 SEALED MOTION for Relief from Judgment Pursuant to FRCP 60(b)(6) by Convolve, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Albritton, Eric)
March 23, 2016 Filing 720 SEALED MOTION for Relief from Judgment Pursuant to FRCP 60(b)(6) by Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc., Hitachi Ltd., Western Digital Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Text of Proposed Order)(Lumish, Douglas)
March 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 719 ORDER granting #718 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Tara S G Sharp terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 03/08/2016. (nkl, )
March 7, 2016 Filing 718 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Withdraw Tara Sharp As Counsel of Record by Convolve, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Albritton, Eric)
March 7, 2016 Filing 717 RESPONSE to #716 Notice (Other), Defendant Dell Inc.'s Response to Convolve's Notice of Supplemental Authority filed by Dell Inc.. (Fulghum, Roger)
February 29, 2016 Filing 716 NOTICE by Convolve, Inc. re #698 Opposed SEALED MOTION Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration of the Final Judgment, to Amend the Final Judgment Pursuant to Rule 59(e), and for Additional and Amended Findings Pursuant to Rule 52(b) (Docket No. 696) Plaintiff Convolve, Inc.'s Notice of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Albritton, Eric)
February 10, 2016 Filing 715 NOTICE by Dell Inc., Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc., Hitachi Ltd., Western Digital Corporation OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Findlay, Eric)
May 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 714 ORDER granting #705 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 5/22/2015. (ch, )
May 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 713 ORDER granting #697 Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limit. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 5/22/2015. (ch, )
May 22, 2015 Filing 712 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re #698 Opposed SEALED MOTION Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration of the Final Judgment, to Amend the Final Judgment Pursuant to Rule 59(e), and for Additional and Amended Findings Pursuant to Rule 52(b) (Docket No. 696) filed by Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc., Hitachi Ltd., Western Digital Corporation. (Findlay, Eric)
May 21, 2015 Filing 711 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #698 Opposed SEALED MOTION Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration of the Final Judgment, to Amend the Final Judgment Pursuant to Rule 59(e), and for Additional and Amended Findings Pursuant to Rule 52(b) (Docket No. 696) filed by Dell Inc.. (Fulghum, Roger)
May 14, 2015 Filing 710 REPLY to Response to Motion re #698 Opposed SEALED MOTION Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration of the Final Judgment, to Amend the Final Judgment Pursuant to Rule 59(e), and for Additional and Amended Findings Pursuant to Rule 52(b) (Docket No. 696) Plaintiffs Reply as to Defendant Dell Inc. In Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration of the Final Judgment, to Amend the Final Judgment Pursuant to Rule 59(e), and for Additional and Amended Findings Pursuant to Rule 52(b) (Docket No. 696) filed by Convolve, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit N, #2 Exhibit O, #3 Exhibit P)(Albritton, Eric)
May 14, 2015 Filing 709 REPLY to Response to Motion re #698 Opposed SEALED MOTION Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration of the Final Judgment, to Amend the Final Judgment Pursuant to Rule 59(e), and for Additional and Amended Findings Pursuant to Rule 52(b) (Docket No. 696) filed by Convolve, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit N, #2 Exhibit O, #3 Exhibit P)(Albritton, Eric)
May 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 708 ORDER of USCA-FEDERAL CIRCUIT granting Convolve's motion to deactivate the appeals to the extent that the appeals are deactivated and the briefing schedules are stayed pending the District Court's rulings on Convolve's motion for reconsideration as to #685 Notice of Appeal - FEDERAL CIRCUIT filed by Western Digital Corporation, #683 Notice of Appeal - FEDERAL CIRCUIT filed by Dell Inc., #684 Notice of Appeal - FEDERAL CIRCUIT filed by Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc., Hitachi Ltd. (dlc, )
May 4, 2015 Filing 707 RESPONSE in Opposition re #698 Opposed SEALED MOTION Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration of the Final Judgment, to Amend the Final Judgment Pursuant to Rule 59(e), and for Additional and Amended Findings Pursuant to Rule 52(b) (Docket No. 696) filed by Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc., Hitachi Ltd., Western Digital Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6)(Findlay, Eric)
May 4, 2015 Filing 706 RESPONSE in Opposition re #698 Opposed SEALED MOTION Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration of the Final Judgment, to Amend the Final Judgment Pursuant to Rule 59(e), and for Additional and Amended Findings Pursuant to Rule 52(b) (Docket No. 696) filed by Dell Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fulghum, Roger)
May 4, 2015 Filing 705 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Dell Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fulghum, Roger)
April 24, 2015 Filing 704 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by USCA-FEDERAL CIRCUIT as to #701 Amended Notice of Appeal - PATENT CASE, #692 Order, #696 Judgment, and Certified copy of Docket Sheet. (dlc, )
April 24, 2015 Filing 703 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by USCA-FEDERAL CIRCUIT as to #700 Amended Notice of Appeal - PATENT CASE, #692 Order, #696 Judgment, and Certified copy of Docket Sheet. (dlc, )
April 24, 2015 Filing 702 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by USCA-FEDERAL CIRCUIT as to #699 Amended Notice of Appeal - PATENT CASE, #692 Order, #696 Judgment, and Certified copy of Docket Sheet. (dlc, )
April 24, 2015 Transmission of Amended Notice of Appeal, #696 Corrected Judgment, #692 Opinion, and Certified copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit by separate email. re #699 Amended Notice of Appeal - FEDERAL CIRCUIT (dlc, )
April 24, 2015 Transmission of Amended Notice of Appeal, #696 Corrected Judgment, #692 Opinion, and Certified copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit by separate email. re #700 Amended Notice of Appeal - FEDERAL CIRCUIT (dlc, )
April 24, 2015 Transmission of Notice of Appeal, #696 Corrected Judgment, #692 Opinion, and Certified copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit by separate email. re #701 Amended Notice of Appeal - FEDERAL CIRCUIT (dlc, )
April 23, 2015 Filing 701 AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL - PATENT CASE as to #685 Notice of Appeal - FEDERAL CIRCUIT by Western Digital Corporation (Findlay, Eric)
April 23, 2015 Filing 700 AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL - PATENT CASE as to #684 Notice of Appeal - FEDERAL CIRCUIT by Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc., Hitachi Ltd. (Findlay, Eric)
April 23, 2015 Filing 699 AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL - PATENT CASE as to #683 Notice of Appeal - FEDERAL CIRCUIT by Dell Inc. (Fulghum, Roger)
April 16, 2015 Filing 698 Opposed SEALED MOTION Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration of the Final Judgment, to Amend the Final Judgment Pursuant to Rule 59(e), and for Additional and Amended Findings Pursuant to Rule 52(b) (Docket No. 696) by Convolve, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Errata D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Text of Proposed Order)(Albritton, Eric)
April 16, 2015 Filing 697 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limit on its Motion for Reconsideration by Convolve, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Albritton, Eric)
March 31, 2015 Filing 696 CORRECTED JUDGMENT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 03/31/2015. (nkl, )
March 31, 2015 Filing 695 JUDGMENT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 03/30/2015. (nkl, )
March 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 694 ORDER denying #682 Motion for Reconsideration and Entry of Judgment in Favor of Dell on Collateral Estoppel Grounds. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 03/29/2015. (nkl, )
March 27, 2015 Filing 693 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc., Hitachi Ltd., Western Digital Corporation (Lumish, Douglas)
March 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 692 OPINION AND ORDER REGARDING LACHES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 03/24/2015. (nkl, )
March 17, 2015 Filing 691 NOTICE of Docketing Notice of Appeal from USCA re #685 Notice of Appeal - FEDERAL CIRCUIT filed by Western Digital Corporation. USCA Case Number 15-1455 (dlc, )
March 17, 2015 Filing 690 NOTICE of Docketing Notice of Appeal from USCA-FEDERAL CIRCUIT re #684 Notice of Appeal - FEDERAL CIRCUIT filed by Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc., Hitachi Ltd. USCA Case Number 15-1454 (dlc, )
March 17, 2015 Filing 689 NOTICE of Docketing Notice of Appeal from USCA-FEDERAL CIRCUIT re #683 Notice of Appeal - FEDERAL CIRCUIT filed by Dell Inc. USCA Case Number 15-1452 (dlc, )
March 16, 2015 Filing 688 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT on 3/16/15, by USCA-FEDERAL CIRCUIT as to #524 Proposed Jury Instructions, #471 Order on Sealed Motion, #650 Order on Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law, #685 Notice of Appeal - FEDERAL CIRCUIT, #677 Memorandum & Opinion, #211 Memorandum & Opinion, #680 Order on Motion for Leave to File, #481 Order, #659 Memorandum & Opinion, #445 Order, #472 Order on Sealed Motion, #441 Order on Sealed Motion, and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet. (dlc, )
March 16, 2015 Filing 687 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT on 3/16/15, by USCA-FEDERAL CIRCUIT as to #524 Proposed Jury Instructions, #650 Order on Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law, #475 Order on Sealed Motion, #211 Memorandum & Opinion, #680 Order, #678 Memorandum & Opinion, #481 Order, #659 Memorandum & Opinion, #445 Order, #472 Order on Sealed Motion, #684 Notice of Appeal - FEDERAL CIRCUIT, #441 Order on Sealed Motion, and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet. (dlc, )
March 16, 2015 Filing 686 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT on 3/16/15, by USCA-FEDERAL CIRCUIT as to #650 Order on Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law, #674 Memorandum & Opinion, #211 Memorandum & Opinion, #680 Order, #676 Memorandum & Opinion, #683 Notice of Appeal - FEDERAL CIRCUIT, #659 Memorandum & Opinion, #445 Order and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet. (dlc, )
March 16, 2015 Transmission of Notice of Appeal, #659 Memorandum Order, #674 Memorandum Order, #676 Memorandum Order, #680 Order, #211 Memorandum Opinion and Order, #445 Order, #650 Order, and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit by separate email. re #683 Notice of Appeal - FEDERAL CIRCUIT (dlc, )
March 16, 2015 Transmission of Notice of Appeal, #659 Memorandum Order, #680 Order, #211 Memorandum Opinion and Order, #445 Order, #650 Order, #678 Memorandum Order, #524 Jury Instructions, #481 Order, #472 Order, #475 Order, #441 Order, and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit by separate email. re #684 Notice of Appeal - FEDERAL CIRCUIT (dlc, )
March 16, 2015 Transmission of Notice of Appeal, #659 Memorandum Order, #680 Order, #211 Memorandum Opinion and Order, #445 Order, #650 Order, #677 Memorandum Order, #524 Jury Instructions, #481 Order, #472 Order, #471 Order, #441 Order, and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit by separate email. re #685 Notice of Appeal - FEDERAL CIRCUIT (dlc, )
March 13, 2015 Filing 685 NOTICE OF APPEAL - FEDERAL CIRCUIT by Western Digital Corporation. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0540-5099604. (Findlay, Eric)
March 13, 2015 Filing 684 NOTICE OF APPEAL - FEDERAL CIRCUIT by Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc., Hitachi Ltd.. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0540-5099566. (Findlay, Eric)
March 13, 2015 Filing 683 NOTICE OF APPEAL - FEDERAL CIRCUIT by Dell Inc.. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0540-5098903. (Fulghum, Roger)
March 12, 2015 Filing 682 MOTION Reconsideration and Entry of Judgment in Favor of Dell on Collateral Estoppel Grounds or in the Altrenative, Clarification of March 3, 2015 Order re #680 Order on Motion for Leave to File,,,,, by Dell Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Fulghum, Roger)
March 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 681 ORDER granting #679 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jack Wesley Hill and Thomas John Ward, Jr terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 03/02/2015. (nkl, )
March 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 680 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #664 Motion for Leave to File; granting in part and denying in part #665 Motion for Leave to File; granting in part and denying in part #667 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 03/02/2015. (nkl, )
February 19, 2015 Filing 679 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and Request for Termination of Electronic Notices by Convolve, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ward, Thomas)
February 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 678 MEMORANDUM ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 02/11/2015. (nkl, )
February 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 677 MEMORANDUM ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 02/11/2015. (nkl, )
February 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 676 MEMORANDUM ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 02/11/2015. (nkl, )
February 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 675 ORDER denying #566 Sealed Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 02/11/2015. (nkl, )
February 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 674 MEMORANDUM ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 02/11/2015. (nkl, )
September 5, 2014 Filing 673 REPLY to Response to Motion re #667 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Leave to Supplement Their Motions for Judgment as a Matter of Law of No Infringement and to Join Defendant Dell Inc.'s Motion (Dkt. No. 665) in Requesting Leave to Supplement Their Motions for Judgment as a filed by Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc., Hitachi Ltd., Western Digital Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Findlay, Eric)
August 25, 2014 Filing 672 RESPONSE in Opposition re #667 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Leave to Supplement Their Motions for Judgment as a Matter of Law of No Infringement and to Join Defendant Dell Inc.'s Motion (Dkt. No. 665) in Requesting Leave to Supplement Their Motions for Judgment as a filed by Convolve, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 20110726 Trial Excerpt)(Albritton, Eric)
August 20, 2014 Filing 671 REPLY to Response to Motion re #664 MOTION for Leave to File to Supplement Its Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Non-Infringement (Docket No. 565) filed by Dell Inc.. (Fulghum, Roger)
August 20, 2014 Filing 670 REPLY to Response to Motion re #665 MOTION for Leave to File to Supplement Its Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law on No Willful Infringement filed by Dell Inc.. (Fulghum, Roger)
August 11, 2014 Filing 669 RESPONSE in Opposition re #665 MOTION for Leave to File to Supplement Its Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law on No Willful Infringement PLAINTIFF CONVOLVE, INC.S RESPONSE AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT INC.S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT ITS MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW ON NO WILLFUL INFRINGEMENT (DOCKET NO. 665) filed by Convolve, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Excerpt from 20110726AM Trans_Willful, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order - Motion for Leave - Willfulness)(Albritton, Eric)
August 11, 2014 Filing 668 RESPONSE in Opposition re #664 MOTION for Leave to File to Supplement Its Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Non-Infringement (Docket No. 565) PLAINTIFF CONVOLVE, INC.S RESPONSE AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT DELL INC.S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT ITS MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW ON NON-INFRINGEMENT (DOCKET NO. 664) filed by Convolve, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Excerpt from 20110726AM Trans_NonInfr, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order - Motion for Leave - Noninfringement)(Albritton, Eric)
August 6, 2014 Filing 667 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Leave to Supplement Their Motions for Judgment as a Matter of Law of No Infringement and to Join Defendant Dell Inc.'s Motion (Dkt. No. 665) in Requesting Leave to Supplement Their Motions for Judgment as a Matter of Law of No Willful Infringement by Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc., Hitachi Ltd., Western Digital Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric)
July 28, 2014 Filing 666 NOTICE by Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc., Hitachi Ltd., Western Digital Corporation re #570 Opposed SEALED MOTION For Judgment As A Matter of Law (Renewed) Pursuant to Rule 50(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, #571 SEALED MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW, #572 MOTION for Entry of Judgment on the Jury Verdict and Enhanced Damages, Attorneys' Fees, and Prejudgment Interest Notice of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Findlay, Eric)
July 25, 2014 Filing 665 MOTION for Leave to File to Supplement Its Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law on No Willful Infringement by Dell Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A)(Fulghum, Roger)
July 25, 2014 Filing 664 MOTION for Leave to File to Supplement Its Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Non-Infringement (Docket No. 565) by Dell Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A)(Fulghum, Roger)
June 6, 2014 Filing 663 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE by Western Digital Corporation, Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc., Hitachi Ltd. to #661 Sealed Document,, filed by Western Digital Corporation, Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc., Hitachi Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Findlay, Eric)
June 6, 2014 Filing 662 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joseph H Lee on behalf of Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc., Hitachi Ltd., Western Digital Corporation (Lee, Joseph)
May 30, 2014 Filing 661 Sealed Document. PLAINTIFF CONVOLVE, INC.S SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF PURSUANT TO THE COURTS MAY 20, 2014 ORDER (DOCKET NO. 660) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Convolve Trial Transcripts July 18 Aftn, #2 Exhibit B - PTX0612, #3 Exhibit C - PTX0197, #4 Exhibit D - PTX0525, #5 Exhibit E - Convolve Trial Transcript July 25, 2011 Morn, #6 Exhibit F - PTX0494, #7 Exhibit G - PTX0114, #8 Exhibit H - US6314473, #9 Exhibit I - Convolve Trial Transcript July 21, Morn, #10 Exhibit J - Convolve Trial Transcript July 25 Aftn, #11 Exhibit K - PTX0069, #12 Exhibit L - PTX0068, #13 Exhibit M - PTX0744, #14 Exhibit N - PTX0032)(Albritton, Eric)
May 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 660 ORDER directing filing of brief for Convolve, Inc., Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc., Hitachi Ltd., Western Digital Corporation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 5/20/2014. (rsp2)
January 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 659 MEMORANDUM ORDER -. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 1/17/2014. (ch, )
October 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 658 ORDER granting #657 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Thomas C Werner; Bruce A Wessel; Richard M Birnholz and David A Schwarz terminated as counsel for Defendant Western Digital Corporation.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 10/24/13. (ehs, )
September 13, 2013 Filing 657 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Western Digital Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric)
June 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 656 ORDER granting #655 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Elizabeth V Thomas terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 6/24/2013. (ch, )
June 21, 2013 Filing 655 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Withdraw Elizabeth Thomas as Counsel of Record by Convolve, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Albritton, Eric)
June 10, 2013 Filing 654 NOTICE by Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc., Hitachi Ltd. re #571 SEALED MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW, #572 MOTION for Entry of Judgment on the Jury Verdict and Enhanced Damages, Attorneys' Fees, and Prejudgment Interest Hitachi's Notice of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Lumish, Douglas)
June 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 653 ORDER granting #652 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Patricia Young; Joseph H Lee and Joseph Shear terminated as counsel for Defendants Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc. and Hitachi Ltd.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 6/4/13. (ehs, )
June 3, 2013 Filing 652 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed on behalf of Joseph H. Lee, Joseph Shear and Patricia Young by Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc., Hitachi Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric)
May 30, 2013 Filing 651 NOTICE of Change of Address by Douglas E Lumish (Lumish, Douglas)
March 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 650 ORDER denying #515 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law; denying #516 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law; denying #518 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law; denying #519 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law; denying #520 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on March 28, 2013. (jml)
March 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 649 ORDER finding as moot #522 Sealed Motion in Limine. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on March 28, 2013. (no document attached) (Payne, Roy)
September 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 648 ORDER finding as moot #509 MOTION to Provide Jurors with Written Copies of Jury Instructions by Dell Inc., Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc., Hitachi Ltd., Western Digital Corporation. (No document attached.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S Payne on September 28, 2012.(jml)
September 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 647 ORDER finding as moot #493 MOTION for Preliminary Instruction on Invalidity Consistent with Microsoft v I4I by Dell Inc. (No document attached.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S Payne on September 28, 2012. (jml)
September 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 646 ORDER granting #645 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Harold Kip Glasscock, Jr terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S Payne on 9/20/2012. (ch, )
September 19, 2012 Filing 645 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Kip Glasscock by Western Digital Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Glasscock, Harold)
September 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 644 ORDER granting #643 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Garland A Kelley terminated as counsel for deft Western Digital Corporation's. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S Payne on 9/18/12. (ehs, )
September 17, 2012 Filing 643 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Garland A. Kelley by Western Digital Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Werner, Thomas)
September 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 642 ORDER granting #641 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Ailis Burpee terminated of record for the Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S Payne on 9/7/12. (ehs, )
September 4, 2012 Filing 641 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Withdraw Ailis Burpee as Counsel and discontinue CM/ECF notices by Convolve, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Albritton, Eric)
August 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 640 ORDER granting #639 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Trevor John Foster terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S Payne on 8/24/2012. (ch, )
August 23, 2012 Filing 639 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Withdraw Trevor J. Foster as Counsel of Record and Terminate CM/ECF Notices by Convolve, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Albritton, Eric)
July 6, 2012 Filing 638 NOTICE of Change of Address by Jack Wesley Hill (Hill, Jack)
February 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 637 ORDER granting #636 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christopher Scott Ponder terminated as counsel for Dell Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S Payne on 2/21/2012. (ch, )
February 16, 2012 Filing 636 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Dell Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ponder, Christopher)
February 3, 2012 Filing 635 NOTICE of Change of Address by Deron R Dacus (Dacus, Deron)
January 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 634 ORDER assigning case to Judge Roy S Payne by consent of the parties for all further proceedings and entry of judgment. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/3/12. (ehs, )
December 19, 2011 Case reassigned to Judge Rodney Gilstrap per Misc. Order 11-2. Judge David Folsom no longer assigned to the case. (mjc, )
November 30, 2011 Filing 633 NOTICE of Change of Address by Douglas E Lumish (Lumish, Douglas)
November 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 632 ORDER granting #631 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jeremy Jason Lang terminated as counsel for defts Hitachi Global Storage Tech Inc and Hitachi Ltd.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 11/16/11. (ehs, )
November 15, 2011 Filing 631 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney J. JASON LANG by Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc., Hitachi Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Lumish, Douglas)
October 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 630 MISC. ORDER 11-1 REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge David Folsom for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 10-3-11. (jml, )
September 16, 2011 Filing 629 NOTICE by Dell Inc. Dell's Notice of Authority Pertaining to New Authority Cited in Plaintiff's Sur-Reply on Willfulness (Fulghum, Roger)
September 14, 2011 Filing 628 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #566 , Convolve, Inc.'s Sur-Reply in Support of its Response and Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendant Western Digital's Motion For Reconsideration Re: Leave to Disclose the Identity of the Public Company Investors in Convolve, filed by Convolve, Inc.. (Anderson, A)
September 14, 2011 Filing 627 SEALED SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #572 MOTION for Entry of Judgment on the Jury Verdict and Enhanced Damages, Attorneys' Fees, and Prejudgment Interest filed by Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc., Hitachi Ltd.. (Lee, Joseph)
September 14, 2011 Filing 626 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #564 , Convolve, Inc.'s Response to Dell's MOTION Renewed Motion for Judgment As A Matter of Law on Damages, filed by Convolve, Inc.. (Anderson, A)
September 14, 2011 Filing 625 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #570 , Convolve, Inc.'s Sur-Reply in Support of its Response and Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendant Western Digital Corporation's Opposed SEALED MOTION For Judgment As A Matter of Law (Renewed) Pursuant to Rule 50(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, filed by Convolve, Inc.. (Anderson, A)
September 14, 2011 Filing 624 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #568 , Convolve, Inc.'s Sur-Reply in Support of its Response to Dell's SEALED MOTION Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law on No Willful Infringement, filed by Convolve, Inc.. (Anderson, A)
September 14, 2011 Filing 623 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #571 , Convolve, Inc.'s Sur-Reply in Support of its Response and Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendants Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc. and Hitachi, Ltd.'s SEALED MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW, filed by Convolve, Inc.. (Anderson, A)
September 14, 2011 Filing 622 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #567 , Convolve, Inc.'s Sur-Reply in Support of its Response to Defendants' Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Invalidity,filed by Convolve, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C to Convolve's Sur-Reply In Support of its Response to Defendants' Renewed JMOL on Invalidity)(Anderson, A)
September 14, 2011 Filing 621 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #569 MOTION Entry of Final Judgment in Support of Its Response in Opposition to Defendant Dell Inc. filed by Convolve, Inc.. (Anderson, A)
September 14, 2011 Filing 620 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #565 , Plaintiff Convolve, Inc.'s Sur-Reply in Support of its Response and Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendant Dell Inc.'s MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law , Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Non-Infringement, filed by Convolve, Inc.. (Anderson, A)
September 14, 2011 Filing 619 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #572 MOTION for Entry of Judgment on the Jury Verdict and Enhanced Damages, Attorneys' Fees, and Prejudgment Interest filed by Western Digital Corporation. (Birnholz, Richard)
September 14, 2011 Filing 618 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #576 Opposed MOTION FOR COSTS UNDER 28 U.S.C. 1920 AND MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT THEREOF filed by Dell Inc., Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc., Hitachi Ltd., Western Digital Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Fulghum, Roger)
September 14, 2011 Filing 617 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #572 , Dell's Sur-Reply to Convolve Inc's MOTION for Entry of Judgment on the Jury Verdict and Enhanced Damages, Attorneys' Fees, and Prejudgment Interest filed by Dell Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Fulghum, Roger)
September 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 616 ORDER granting #610 Motion for Leave to File Excess Page Limit on Their Reply in Support of Their Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 9/12/11. (ehs, )
September 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 615 ORDER granting #607 Motion for Leave to File Excess Page on its Reply And Memorandum Of Law In Support Of Its Motion for Entry of Judgment on the Jury Verdict And Prejudgment Interest. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 9/12/11. (ehs, )
September 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 614 ORDER granting #605 Motion for Leave to File Excess Page limit on its Reply In Support Of Its Motion for Entry of Judgment on the Jury Verdict and Enhanced Damages, Attorneys Fees, and Prejudgment Interest As To Defendants Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc. And Hitachi, Ltd.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 9/12/11. (ehs, )
September 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 613 ORDER granting #603 Motion for Leave to File Excess Page limit on its Reply And Memorandum Of Law In Support Of Its Motion Costs Under 28 U.S.C. 1920. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 9/12/11. (ehs, )
September 9, 2011 Filing 612 AMENDED PROPOSED BILL OF COSTS filed by Convolve, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Amended Bill of Costs, #2 Exhibit B I to Amended Bill of Costs, #3 Exhibit B II to Amended Bill of Costs, #4 Exhibit B III to Amended Bill of Costs, #5 Exhibit C to Amended Bill of Costs, #6 Exhibit D to Amended Bill of Costs, #7 Exhibit E to Amended Bill of Costs)(Anderson, A)
September 9, 2011 ***FILED IN ERROR, CANNOT USE THIS EVENT - ATTY MUST FILE AN AMENDED PROPOSED BILL OF COSTS. Document # 608, Additional Attachment to main document. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (sm, )
September 8, 2011 Filing 611 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #571 SEALED MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW filed by Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc., Hitachi Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Lang, Jeremy)
September 8, 2011 Filing 610 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc., Hitachi Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lang, Jeremy)
September 8, 2011 Filing 609 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #566 Opposed SEALED MOTION For Reconsideration Re: Leave to Disclose the Identity of the Public Company Investors in Convolve filed by Western Digital Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit F, #2 Bray decision, #3 S&T Oil decision, #4 Visto decision)(Wessel, Bruce)
September 8, 2011 Filing 608 ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE.***Additional Attachments to Main Document: #577 Proposed Bill of Costs.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Convolve's Amended Bill of Costs, #2 Exhibit B I to Convolve's Amended Bill of Costs, #3 Exhibit B II to Convolve's Amended Bill of Costs, #4 Exhibit B III to Convolve's Amended Bill of Costs, #5 Exhibit C to Convolve's Amended Bill of Costs, #6 Exhibit D to Convolve's Amended Bill of Costs, #7 Exhibit E to Convolve's Amended Bill of Costs)(Anderson, A) Modified on 9/9/2011 (sm, ).
September 8, 2011 Filing 607 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Convolve, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order for Motion to Exceed Page Limit)(Anderson, A)
September 8, 2011 Filing 606 REPLY to Response to Motion re #572 MOTION for Entry of Judgment on the Jury Verdict and Enhanced Damages, Attorneys' Fees, and Prejudgment Interest filed by Convolve, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit N to Convolve's Reply In Support Of Its Motion for Entry of Judgment and Prejudgment Interest, #2 Exhibit O to Convolve's Reply In Support Of Its Motion for Entry of Judgment and Prejudgment Interest)(Anderson, A)
September 8, 2011 Filing 605 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Convolve, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order for Motion to Exceed Page Limit)(Anderson, A)
September 8, 2011 Filing 604 REPLY to Response to Motion re #572 MOTION for Entry of Judgment on the Jury Verdict and Enhanced Damages, Attorneys' Fees, and Prejudgment Interest As to Hitachi filed by Convolve, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit N to Convolve's Response In Support of Its Motion for Enhanced Damages and Attorneys' Fees as to Hitachi, #2 Exhibit O to Convolve's Response In Support of Its Motion for Enhanced Damages and Attorneys' Fees as to Hitachi)(Anderson, A)
September 8, 2011 Filing 603 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Convolve, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order for Convolve's Motion to Exceed Page Limit)(Anderson, A)
September 8, 2011 Filing 602 REPLY to Response to Motion re #576 Opposed MOTION FOR COSTS UNDER 28 U.S.C. 1920 AND MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT THEREOF filed by Convolve, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 27 to Convolve's Reply and MOL In Support of Its Motion for Costs Under 28 U.S.C. Section 1920, #2 Exhibit 28 to Convolve's Reply and MOL In Support of Its Motion for Costs Under 28 U.S.C. Section 1920, #3 Exhibit 29 to Convolve's Reply and MOL In Support of Its Motion for Costs Under 28 U.S.C. Section 1920, #4 Exhibit 30 to Convolve's Reply and MOL In Support of Its Motion for Costs Under 28 U.S.C. Section 1920, #5 Exhibit 31 to Convolve's Reply and MOL In Support of Its Motion for Costs Under 28 U.S.C. Section 1920, #6 Exhibit 32 to Convolve's Reply and MOL In Support of Its Motion for Costs Under 28 U.S.C. Section 1920, #7 Exhibit 33 to Convolve's Reply and MOL In Support of Its Motion for Costs Under 28 U.S.C. Section 1920)(Anderson, A)
September 8, 2011 Filing 601 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #572 In Support of Convolve's MOTION for Entry of Judgment on the Jury Verdict and Enhanced Damages, Attorneys' Fees, and Prejudgment Interest as to Defendant Western Digital Corp. filed by Convolve, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit N to Convolve's Reply In Support of Its Motion for Enhanced Damages and Attorneys' Fees as to Defendant Western Digital Corp.)(Anderson, A)
September 8, 2011 Filing 600 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #572 In Support of Convolve's MOTION for Entry of Judgment on the Jury Verdict and Enhanced Damages, Attorneys' Fees, and Prejudgment Interest As to Defendant Dell Inc. filed by Convolve, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit N to Convolve's Reply In Support of Its Motion for Enhanced Damages and Attorneys' Fees as to Defendant Dell Inc., #2 Exhibit O to Convolve's Reply In Support of Its Motion for Enhanced Damages and Attorneys' Fees as to Defendant Dell Inc.)(Anderson, A)
September 8, 2011 Filing 599 REPLY to Response to Motion re #569 MOTION Entry of Final Judgment filed by Dell Inc.. (Fulghum, Roger)
September 8, 2011 Filing 598 REPLY to Response to Motion re #565 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law , Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Non-Infringement, filed by Dell Inc.. (Fulghum, Roger)
September 8, 2011 Filing 597 REPLY to Response to Motion re #567 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law , Defendants' Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Invalidity filed by Dell Inc., Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc., Hitachi Ltd., Western Digital Corporation. (Fulghum, Roger)
September 8, 2011 Filing 596 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #570 Opposed SEALED MOTION For Judgment As A Matter of Law (Renewed) Pursuant to Rule 50(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil ProcedureOpposed SEALED MOTION For Judgment As A Matter of Law (Renewed) Pursuant to Rule 50(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure filed by Western Digital Corporation. (Birnholz, Richard)
September 8, 2011 Filing 595 REPLY to Response to Motion re #564 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Renewed Motion for Judgment As A Matter of Law on Damages, filed by Dell Inc.. (Fulghum, Roger)
September 8, 2011 Filing 594 REPLY to Response to Motion re #568 SEALED MOTION Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law on No Willful Infringement filed by Dell Inc.. (Fulghum, Roger)
September 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 593 ORDER granting #584 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages on Opposition of Pltf's motion for entry of judgment on the Jury Verdict and Damages, Attorneys Fees, and Prejudgment Interest. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 9/2/11. (ehs, )
September 2, 2011 Filing 592 SEALED RESPONSE in opposition to #571 Motion for Judgment filed by Convolve, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Anderson, A) Modified on 9/2/2011 (sm, ).
September 2, 2011 ***FILED IN ERROR, PER ATTY, ATTY HAS REFILED (SEE #592). Document # 591, Sealed Response. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (sm, )
September 1, 2011 Filing 591 ***FILED IN ERROR, PER ATTY, PLEASE IGNORE****SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #571 SEALED MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW filed by Convolve, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Anderson, A) Modified on 9/2/2011 (sm, ).
September 1, 2011 Filing 590 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #570 Opposed SEALED MOTION For Judgment As A Matter of Law (Renewed) Pursuant to Rule 50(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil ProcedureOpposed SEALED MOTION For Judgment As A Matter of Law (Renewed) Pursuant to Rule 50(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure filed by Convolve, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Anderson, A)
September 1, 2011 Filing 589 SEALED RESPONSE Plaintiff Convolve, Inc.'s Response and Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendant Dell, Inc.'s SEALED MOTION Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law on No Willful Infringement filed by Convolve, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Anderson, A)
September 1, 2011 Filing 588 SEALED RESPONSE Plaintiff Convolve, Inc.'s Response And Memorandum of Law In Opposition To Defendant Dell Inc.'s Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Noninfringement (Docket No. 565) filed by Convolve, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Anderson, A)
September 1, 2011 Filing 587 SEALED RESPONSE PLAINTIFF CONVOLVE, INC.'S RESPONSE TO DELL'S RENEWED MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW ON DAMAGES (DOCKET NO. 564) filed by Convolve, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Anderson, A)
September 1, 2011 Filing 586 SEALED RESPONSE PLAINTIFF CONVOLVE, INC.S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS RENEWEDMOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW ON INVALIDITY (DOCKET NO. 567)filed by Convolve, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Anderson, A)
September 1, 2011 Filing 585 RESPONSE in Opposition re #572 MOTION for Entry of Judgment on the Jury Verdict and Enhanced Damages, Attorneys' Fees, and Prejudgment Interest filed by Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc., Hitachi Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Lee, Joseph)
September 1, 2011 Filing 584 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Opposition to Convolve, Inc.s Motion for Entry of Judgment on the Jury Verdict and Enhanced Damages Attorneys Fees, and Prejudgment Interest by Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc., Hitachi Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lee, Joseph)
September 1, 2011 Filing 583 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #572 MOTION for Entry of Judgment on the Jury Verdict and Enhanced Damages, Attorneys' Fees, and Prejudgment Interest filed by Western Digital Corporation. (Birnholz, Richard)
September 1, 2011 Filing 582 RESPONSE to Motion re #569 MOTION Entry of Final Judgment Plaintiff Convolve, Inc.'s Response to Dell's Motion for Entry of Final Judgment (Dkt. No. 569) filed by Convolve, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Anderson, A)
September 1, 2011 Filing 581 RESPONSE in Opposition re #576 Opposed MOTION FOR COSTS UNDER 28 U.S.C. 1920 AND MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT THEREOF filed by Dell Inc., Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc., Hitachi Ltd., Western Digital Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fulghum, Roger)
September 1, 2011 Filing 580 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #572 MOTION for Entry of Judgment on the Jury Verdict and Enhanced Damages, Attorneys' Fees, and Prejudgment Interest-- Dell's Opposition to Convolve Inc's Motion for Enhanced Damages and Attorneys' Fees, filed by Dell Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fulghum, Roger)
September 1, 2011 Filing 579 RESPONSE to Motion re #572 MOTION for Entry of Judgment on the Jury Verdict and Enhanced Damages, Attorneys' Fees, and Prejudgment Interest Defendants' Joint Response to Convolve Inc's Motion for Entry of Judgment on the Jury Verdict and for Pre-Judgment Interest filed by Dell Inc., Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc., Hitachi Ltd., Western Digital Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Fulghum, Roger) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/1/2011: #3 Text of Proposed Order) (sm, ).
September 1, 2011 Filing 578 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #566 Opposed SEALED MOTION For Reconsideration Re: Leave to Disclose the Identity of the Public Company Investors in Convolve filed by Convolve, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Text of Proposed Order)Albritton, Eric)
August 22, 2011 Filing 577 PROPOSED BILL OF COSTS filed by Convolve, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B Part I, #3 Exhibit B Part II, #4 Exhibit B Part III, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F)(Anderson, A)
August 22, 2011 Filing 576 Opposed MOTION FOR COSTS UNDER 28 U.S.C. 1920 AND MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT THEREOF by Convolve, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Bill of Costs, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10 - Part 1, #11 Exhibit 10 - Part 2, #12 Exhibit 10 - Part 3, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18, #21 Exhibit 19, #22 Exhibit 20, #23 Exhibit 21, #24 Exhibit 22, #25 Exhibit 23, #26 Exhibit 24, #27 Exhibit 25, #28 Exhibit 26)(Anderson, A) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/23/2011: #29 Text of Proposed Order) (sm, ).
August 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 575 ORDER granting #573 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages for Entry of Judgment on the Jury Verdict and Enhanced Damages, Attorneys Fees, and Prejudgment Interest. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 8/22/11. (ehs, )
August 22, 2011 ***FILED IN ERROR PER ATTY, WRONG EVENT USED, ATTY WILL REFILE. Document # 574, Proposed bill of costs. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (sm, )
August 19, 2011 Filing 574 ***FILED IN ERROR, PER ATTY, PLEASE IGNORE.***PROPOSED BILL OF COSTS filed by Convolve, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Bill of Costs, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 10 - Part I, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 10 - Part II, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 10 - Part III, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit Exhibit 18, #21 Exhibit Exhibit 19, #22 Exhibit Exhibit 20, #23 Exhibit Exhibit 21, #24 Exhibit Exhibit 22, #25 Exhibit Exhibit 23, #26 Exhibit Exhibit 24, #27 Exhibit Exhibit 25, #28 Exhibit Exhibit 26)(Anderson, A) Modified on 8/22/2011 (sm, ).
August 19, 2011 Filing 573 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages on Convolve's Motion for Entry of Judgment on the Jury Verdict and Enhanced Damages, Attorneys' Fees, and Prejudgment Interest by Convolve, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Anderson, A)
August 19, 2011 Filing 572 MOTION for Entry of Judgment on the Jury Verdict and Enhanced Damages, Attorneys' Fees, and Prejudgment Interest by Convolve, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Text of Proposed Order Judgment)(Anderson, A)
August 19, 2011 Filing 571 SEALED MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW by Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc., Hitachi Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Text of Proposed Order)(Lang, Jeremy)
August 19, 2011 Filing 570 Opposed SEALED MOTION For Judgment As A Matter of Law (Renewed) Pursuant to Rule 50(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by Western Digital Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - NY 8-16-11 Order, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Birnholz, Richard)
August 19, 2011 Filing 569 MOTION Entry of Final Judgment by Dell Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fulghum, Roger)
August 19, 2011 Filing 568 SEALED MOTION Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law on No Willful Infringement by Dell Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Fulghum, Roger)
August 19, 2011 Filing 567 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law , Defendants' Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Invalidity by Dell Inc., Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc., Hitachi Ltd., Western Digital Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fulghum, Roger)
August 19, 2011 Filing 566 Opposed SEALED MOTION For Reconsideration Re: Leave to Disclose the Identity of the Public Company Investors in Convolve by Western Digital Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - , #2 Exhibit B - #3 Exhibit C - #4 Exhibit D - Wessel LT Anderson, #5 Exhibit E -#6 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) Modified on 8/22/2011 (sm, ).
August 19, 2011 Filing 565 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law , Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Non-Infringement, by Dell Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fulghum, Roger)
August 19, 2011 Filing 564 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Renewed Motion for Judgment As A Matter of Law on Damages, by Dell Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fulghum, Roger)
August 18, 2011 Filing 563 SEALED RESPONSE TO NON-MOTION (Dkt. No. 537) - CONVOLVES RESPONSE TO HITACHIS NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF HITACHIS EMERGENCY MOTION TO COMPEL CONVOLVE TO RETURN PTX-744 (Thomas, Elizabeth)
August 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 562 ORDER granting #561 Motion to Amend Post-Trial briefing schedule. Deadline for filing all post-trial motions due Motions Friday, August 19, 2011. Deadline for filing responsive briefs in opposition to post-trial motions due Thursday, September 1, 2011. Deadline for filing reply briefs in support of post-trial motions Thursday, September 8, 2011. Deadline for filing sur-reply briefs in opposition to post-trial motions, if necessary Wednesday, September 14, 2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 8/16/11. (ehs, )
August 15, 2011 Filing 561 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct PARTIES JOINT MOTION REGARDING A PROPOSED POST-TRIAL BRIEFING SCHEDULE by Convolve, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Thomas, Elizabeth)
August 12, 2011 Filing 560 SEALED RESPONSE to #514 Reply Of Defendants Western Digital And Hitachi In Support Of Defendants' Trial Brief Re: Laches filed by Western Digital Corporation, Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc., Hitachi Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Wessel, Bruce)
August 12, 2011 Filing 559 RESPONSE to #514 Sealed Document Dell's Reply in Support of Defendants' Trial Brief on Laches, by Dell Inc.. (Fulghum, Roger)
August 9, 2011 Filing 558 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 7/26/11 Afternoon Session before Judge Chad Everingham. Court Reporter/Transcriber: S. Simmons/S. Holmes,Telephone number: 903/935-3868.

< Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 9/2/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/12/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/10/2011. (lss, )

August 9, 2011 Filing 557 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 7/26/11 Morning Session before Judge Chad Everingham. Court Reporter/Transcriber: S. Simmons/S. Holmes,Telephone number: 903/935-3868.

< Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 9/2/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/12/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/10/2011. (lss, )

August 9, 2011 Filing 556 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 7/25/11 Afternoon Session before Judge Chad Everingham. Court Reporter/Transcriber: S. Simmons/S. Holmes,Telephone number: 903/935-3868.

< Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 9/2/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/12/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/10/2011. (lss, )

August 9, 2011 Filing 555 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 7/25/11 Morning Session before Judge Chad Everingham. Court Reporter/Transcriber: S. Simmons/S. Holmes,Telephone number: 903/935-3868.

< Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 9/2/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/12/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/10/2011. (lss, )

August 9, 2011 Filing 554 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 7/22/11 Afternoon Session before Judge Chad Everingham. Court Reporter/Transcriber: S. Simmons/S. Holmes,Telephone number: 903/935-3868.

< Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 9/2/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/12/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/10/2011. (lss, )

August 9, 2011 Filing 553 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 7/22/11 Morning Session before Judge Chad Everingham. Court Reporter/Transcriber: S. Simmons/S. Holmes,Telephone number: 903/935-3868.

< Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 9/2/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/12/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/10/2011. (lss, )

August 9, 2011 Filing 552 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 7/21/11 Afternoon Session before Judge Chad Everingham. Court Reporter/Transcriber: S. Simmons/S. Holmes,Telephone number: 903/935-3868.

< Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 9/2/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/12/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/10/2011. (lss, )

August 9, 2011 Filing 551 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 7/21/11 Morning Session before Judge Chad Everingham. Court Reporter/Transcriber: S. Simmons/S. Holmes,Telephone number: 903/935-3868.

< Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 9/2/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/12/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/10/2011. (lss, )

August 9, 2011 Filing 550 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 7/20/11 Afternoon Session before Judge 903/935-3868. Court Reporter/Transcriber: S. Simmons/S. Holmes,Telephone number: 903/935-3868.

< Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 9/2/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/12/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/10/2011. (lss, )

August 9, 2011 Filing 549 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 7/20/11 Morning Session before Judge Chad Everingham. Court Reporter/Transcriber: S. Simmons/S. Holmes,Telephone number: 903/935-3868.

< Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 9/2/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/12/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/10/2011. (lss, )

August 9, 2011 Filing 548 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 7/19/11 Afternoon Session before Judge Chad Everingham. Court Reporter/Transcriber: S. Simmons/S. Holmes,Telephone number: 903/935-3868.

< Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 9/2/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/12/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/10/2011. (lss, )

August 9, 2011 Filing 547 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 7/19/11 Morning Session before Judge Chad Everingham. Court Reporter/Transcriber: S. Simmons/S. Holmes,Telephone number: 903/935-3868.

< Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 9/2/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/12/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/10/2011. (lss, )

August 9, 2011 Filing 546 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 7/18/11 Afternoon Session before Judge Chad Everingham. Court Reporter/Transcriber: S. Simmons/S. Holmes,Telephone number: 903/935-3868.

< Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 9/2/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/12/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/10/2011. (lss, )

August 9, 2011 Filing 545 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 7/18/11 Morning Session before Judge Chad Everingham. Court Reporter/Transcriber: S. Simmons/S. Holmes,Telephone number: 903/935-3868.

< Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 9/2/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/12/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/10/2011. (lss, )

August 9, 2011 Filing 544 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 7/12/11 Exhibit Hearing before Judge Chad Everingham. Court Reporter/Transcriber: S. Simmons/S. Holmes,Telephone number: 903/935-3868.

< Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 9/2/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/12/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/10/2011. (lss, )

August 9, 2011 Filing 543 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 7/5/11 Jury Selection before Judge Chad Everingham. Court Reporter/Transcriber: S. Simmons/S. Holmes,Telephone number: 903/935-3868.

< Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 9/2/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/12/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/10/2011. (lss, )

August 5, 2011 Filing 542 Sealed Document - Plaintiff Convolve, Inc.'s Response to #514 Defendants' Trial Brief Re: Laches.(Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Convolve's Response to Defendants' Trial Brief Re: Laches, #2 Text of Proposed Order to Convolve's Response to Defendants' Trial Brief Re: Laches)(Halsey, Anna)
August 5, 2011 Filing 541 SEALED Convolve, Inc.'s Answer and Affirmative Defenses to #450 Defendant Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc.'s Sealed Answer to Convolve, Inc.'s Second Amended Complaint, Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims. filed by Convolve, Inc.. (Anderson, A)
August 5, 2011 Filing 540 SEALED Convolve, Inc.'s Answer and Affirmative Defenses to #451 Defendant Hitachi, Ltd's Sealed Answer to Convolve, Inc.'s Second Amended Complaint, Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims. filed by Convolve, Inc. (Anderson, A)
August 5, 2011 Filing 539 Convolve, Inc.'s ANSWER to #448 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim and Affirmative Defenses to Western Digital Corporation's Counterclaims by Convolve, Inc..(Anderson, A)
August 5, 2011 Filing 538 Convolve, Inc.'s ANSWER to #449 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim and Affirmative Defenses to Dell, Inc.'s Counterclaims by Convolve, Inc..(Anderson, A)
August 3, 2011 Filing 537 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT Notice of Supplemental Evidence in Support of Emergency Motion by Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc. and Hitachi Ltd. to Compel Convolve, Inc. to Return Privileged Document HGSTC0006046291-7 Pursuant to the Protective Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit L, #2 Exhibit M, #3 Exhibit N, #4 Exhibit O, #5 Exhibit P, #6 Exhibit Q, #7 Exhibit R, #8 Exhibit S)(Young, Patricia)
August 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 536 ORDER granting #535 Motion to Amend deadlines. Answer to Defendants Counterclaims due August 5, 2011. Convolves Response to Defendants Trial Brief On Laches, due August 5, 2011 Defendants Reply In Support Of Its Trial Brief On Laches due, August 12, 2011.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 8/2/11. (ehs, )
August 1, 2011 Filing 535 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Deadlines by Convolve, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Halsey, Anna)
July 29, 2011 Filing 530 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham: Jury Trial held on 7/29/2011. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR.) (jml)
July 27, 2011 Filing 527 Defendants' Final Trial Exhibit List. (jml)
July 27, 2011 Filing 526 Plaintiff's Final Trial Exhibit List. (jml)
July 26, 2011 Filing 534 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham: Jury Trial completed on 7/26/2011. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR.) (jml)
July 26, 2011 Filing 525 SEALED Jury Notes. (jml)
July 26, 2011 Filing 524 Proposed Jury Instructions (by all parties) Refused by the Court on 7/26/11.(jml)
July 26, 2011 Filing 523 JURY VERDICT. (jml)
July 26, 2011 Filing 522 SEALED MOTION in Limine to Preclude Testimony From Dr. Neil Singer Regarding Delay ("This is the same motion given to the Court by hand during today's proceedings") by Western Digital Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
July 26, 2011 Filing 521 Proposed Jury Instructions by Dell Inc.. (Fulghum, Roger)
July 25, 2011 Filing 533 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham: Jury Trial held on 7/25/2011. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR.) (jml)
July 25, 2011 Filing 520 Opposed MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law by Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc., Hitachi Ltd.. Responses due by 8/8/2011 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lang, Jeremy)
July 25, 2011 Filing 519 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Non-Infringement by Dell Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron)
July 25, 2011 Filing 518 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Invalidity by Dell Inc., Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc., Hitachi Ltd., Western Digital Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron)
July 25, 2011 Filing 517 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law as a Matter of Law on Damages by Dell Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron)
July 25, 2011 Filing 516 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law on No Willful Infringement by Dell Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron)
July 25, 2011 Filing 515 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law by Western Digital Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
July 25, 2011 Filing 514 Sealed Document - Defendants' Trial Brief re Laches (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Excerpts from Deposition of Neil Singer 7-17-2002, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
July 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 513 ORDER granting #505 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Amanda Woodall be withdrawn as counsel of Record andremoved from the electronic service list for this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/25/11. (ehs, )
July 25, 2011 NOTICE FROM CLERK re #512 Proposed Findings of Fact and Notice of Docket Correction re #512. #512 is being modified by clerk, per atty, to reflect that it is revised Jury Verdict instead of findings of fact. Wrong event was used but case in trial and so will be revised like it was in previous filings. PLEASE DISREGARD PREVIOUS CLERK NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRRECTION re #512. (sm, )
July 25, 2011 *** ( PLEASE IGNORE) FILED IN ERROR, WRONG EVENT USED, ATTY MUST REFILE. Document # 512, Proposed findings of fact. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (sm, ) Modified on 7/25/2011 (sm, ). Modified on 7/25/2011 (sm, ).
July 24, 2011 Filing 512 REVISED JURY VERDICT by Dell Inc., Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc., Hitachi Ltd., Western Digital Corporation. (Dacus, Deron) Modified on 7/25/2011 (sm, ). Modified on 7/25/2011 (sm, ).
July 24, 2011 Filing 511 REVISED Proposed Jury Instructions by Dell Inc., Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc., Hitachi Ltd., Western Digital Corporation. (Dacus, Deron) Modified on 7/25/2011 (sm, ).
July 22, 2011 Filing 532 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham: Jury Trial held on 7/22/2011. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR.) (jml)
July 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 510 ORDER denying #308 Moton for Spoliation Sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on July 22, 2011. (jml)
July 22, 2011 Filing 509 MOTION to Provide Jurors with Written Copies of Jury Instructions by Dell Inc., Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc., Hitachi Ltd., Western Digital Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Shari Seidman Diamond, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron)
July 22, 2011 Filing 508 ***SEALED PER ATTY***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT. PLEASE IGNORE.*** MOTION to Provide Jurors with Written Copies of Jury Instructions by Dell Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Shari Seidman Diamond, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron) Modified on 7/22/2011 (ch, ). Modified on 7/22/2011 (ch, ).
July 22, 2011 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the 508 submitted by Dell Inc.. NO CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE. Correction should be made by one business day (ch, )
July 21, 2011 Filing 531 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham: Jury Trial held on 7/21/2011. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR.) (jml)
July 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 507 ORDER granting #504 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Amanda Woodall terminated as counsel for Dell Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/21/11. (ehs, )
July 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 506 ORDER granting #413 Motion for Leave to Exceed the pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/20/2011. (ch, )
July 21, 2011 Filing 505 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Dell Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Parker, Joshua)
July 20, 2011 Filing 504 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Dell Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Woodall, Amanda)
July 19, 2011 Filing 529 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham: Jury Trial held on 7/19/2011. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR.) (jml)
July 19, 2011 Filing 503 Additional Attachments to Main Document (Certificate of Service): #497 Exhibit List.. (Thomas, Elizabeth) Modified on 7/19/2011 (sm, ).
July 19, 2011 Filing 502 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Gene C Schaerr for Dell Inc. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-620. (ch, )
July 19, 2011 Filing 501 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Kathleen B Barry for Dell Inc. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-620. (ch, )
July 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 500 ORDER granting #485 Sealed supplemental motion in limine to limit reference to Plaintiffs litigation financing, except the 2003 and 2006 private placement memoranda. The court ORDERS the parties to approach the bench before referencing any litigation financing evidence, including the 2003 and 2006 private placement memoranda.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/19/11. (ehs, )
July 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 499 ORDER denying #467 Sealed supplemental motion in limine to limit references to the Censtor Licenses by Plaintiff and its damages expert, Mr. Bruce McFarlane. The court DENIES Western Digitals motion. The court, however, notes that if Plaintiff establishes the comparability of the Censtor Licenses in front of the jury, it will render the licenses admissible for all purposes.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/19/11. (ehs, )
July 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 498 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #466 Motion in Limine. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/19/2011. (ch, )
July 18, 2011 Filing 528 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham: Jury Trial held on 7/18/2011. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR.) (jml)
July 18, 2011 Filing 497 Exhibit List (Trial) by Convolve, Inc... (Thomas, Elizabeth)
July 18, 2011 Filing 496 Second Amended Trial Witness List by Convolve, Inc.. (Edwards, Stephen)
July 17, 2011 Filing 495 SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re #478 Emergency SEALED PATENT MOTION to Compel Convolve, Inc. to Return Privileged Document HGSTC0006046291-7 Pursuant to the Protective Order filed by Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc., Hitachi Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Amended Order, #2 Exhibit F, #3 Exhibit G, #4 Exhibit H, #5 Exhibit I, #6 Exhibit J, #7 Exhibit K)(Young, Patricia)
July 17, 2011 Filing 494 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #485 Opposed SEALED MOTION - Defendants' Supplemental Motion in Limine to Limit Reference Convolve's Litigation Financing, Except the 2003 and 2006 Private Placements Memoranda - filed by Western Digital Corporation. (Smith, Melissa)
July 15, 2011 Filing 493 MOTION for Preliminary Instruction on Invalidity Consistent with Microsoft v I4I by Dell Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fulghum, Roger)
July 15, 2011 Filing 492 Amended Trial Witness List by Convolve, Inc.. (Edwards, Stephen)
July 15, 2011 Filing 491 SEALED RESPONSE-Convolve, Inc.'s Opposition to Hitachi's Emergency Motion To Compel Convolve to Return Privileged Document HGSTC0006046291-7 Pursuant to the Protective Order (Dkt. No. 478)filed by Convolve, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Convolve's Opposition to Hitachi's Emergency Motion to Compel, #2 Exhibit B to Convolve's Opposition to Hitachi's Emergency Motion to Compel, #3 Exhibit C to Convolve's Opposition to Hitachi's Emergency Motion to Compel, #4 Exhibit D to Convolve's Opposition to Hitachi's Emergency Motion to Compel, #5 Exhibit E to Convolve's Opposition to Hitachi's Emergency Motion to Compel, #6 Exhibit F to Convolve's Opposition to Hitachi's Emergency Motion to Compel, #7 Exhibit G to Convolve's Opposition to Hitachi's Emergency Motion to Compel, #8 Exhibit H to Convolve's Opposition to Hitachi's Emergency Motion to Compel, #9 Exhibit I to Convolve's Opposition to Hitachi's Emergency Motion to Compel, #10 Exhibit J to Convolve's Opposition to Hitachi's Emergency Motion to Compel, #11 Exhibit K to Convolve's Opposition to Hitachi's Emergency Motion to Compel, #12 Exhibit L to Convolve's Opposition to Hitachi's Emergency Motion to Compel, #13 Text of Proposed Order to Convolve's Opposition to Hitachi's Emergency Motion to Compel)(Thomas, Elizabeth)
July 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 490 ORDER - The court carries Plaintiffs objections until it can ascertain the manner in which Defendants plan to use Mr. Singers personal deposition testimony.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/15/11. (ehs, )
July 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 489 ORDER withdrawing #443 Sealed Motion; granting #479 Motion to Withdraw. Defendants motion is GRANTED, and Defendants Motion to Strike Portions of Convolves Expert Reports (Docket No. 443) is WITHDRAWN.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/15/11. (ehs, )
July 15, 2011 Filing 488 SEALED RESPONSE-Convolve, Inc.'s Objections to Defendants' Supplemental Motion In Limine Reference to Convolve's Litigation Financing, Except the 2003 and 2006 Private Placement Memoranda (Dkt. No. 485) filed by Convolve, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Convolve's Objections to Defendants' Supplemental Motion In Limine Reference to Convolve's Litigation Financing, Except the 2003 and 2006 Private Placement Memoranda, #2 Exhibit B to Convolve's Objections to Defendants' Supplemental Motion In Limine Reference to Convolve's Litigation Financing, Except the 2003 and 2006 Private Placement Memoranda, #3 Exhibit C to Convolve's Objections to Defendants' Supplemental Motion In Limine Reference to Convolve's Litigation Financing, Except the 2003 and 2006 Private Placement Memoranda, #4 Exhibit D to Convolve's Objections to Defendants' Supplemental Motion In Limine Reference to Convolve's Litigation Financing, Except the 2003 and 2006 Private Placement Memoranda, #5 Text of Proposed Order to Convolve's Objections to Defendants' Supplemental Motion In Limine Reference to Convolve's Litigation Financing, Except the 2003 and 2006 Private Placement Memoranda)(Anderson, A)
July 15, 2011 Filing 487 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #466 Supplemental MOTION in Limine on McFarlane Testimony Concerning Royalty Rate Reflected in Altec Lansing License filed by Dell Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Fulghum, Roger)
July 14, 2011 Filing 486 SEALED RESPONSE Convolve, Inc.'s Objections to #466 Defendant Dell's Supplemental Motion in Limine on McFarlane Testimony Concerning Royalty Rate Reflected in Altec Lansing License filed by Convolve, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Convolve's Objections to Dell's Supplemental Motion in Limine, #2 Exhibit B to Convolve's Objections to Dell's Supplemental Motion in Limine, #3 Text of Proposed Order to Convolve's Objections to Dell's Supplemental Motion in Limine)(Anderson, A)
July 14, 2011 Filing 485 Opposed SEALED MOTION - Defendants' Supplemental Motion in Limine to Limit Reference Convolve's Litigation Financing, Except the 2003 and 2006 Private Placements Memoranda - by Dell Inc., Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc., Hitachi Ltd., Western Digital Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Explanation of Redactions, #2 Exhibit - Defendants' JTX 1310, #3 Exhibit - Defendants' JTX 1313)(Smith, Melissa) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/15/2011: #4 Text of Proposed Order) (sm, ).
July 14, 2011 Filing 483 SEALED RESPONSE Convolve, Inc.'s Objections to Western Digital's Supplemental Motion in Limine to Limit References to the Censtor Licenses by Convolve and Its Witnesses Dkt. 467 filed by Convolve, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Convolve's Objections to Western Digital's Supplemental Motion in Limine, #2 Exhibit B to Convolve's Objections to Western Digital's Supplemental Motion in Limine, #3 Exhibit C to Convolve's Objections to Western Digital's Supplemental Motion in Limine, #4 Text of Proposed Order to Convolve's Objections to Western Digital's Supplemental Motion in Limine)(Anderson, A)
July 14, 2011 Filing 482 NOTICE of Hearing: Jury Trial set for 7/18/2011 08:30 AM in Mag Ctrm (Marshall) before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham. (jml)
July 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 481 ORDER - The court held exhibit hearings in this matter on June 23, 2011 and July 12, 2011. The court carried three objections. The courts rulings on these objections are set forth herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/14/11. (ehs, )
July 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 480 ORDER - pending before the Court is defendant Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc. and Hitachi LTD.s emergency motion to compel plaintiff Convolve, Inc. to return certain privileged documents (Dkt. No. 478). The court ORDERS Convolve to respond to this motion by Friday, July 15, 2011.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/14/11. (ehs, )
July 13, 2011 Filing 479 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw #443 SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion to Strike the Portions of Convolve's Expert Reports That Are Based on Testing of Devices That Were Not Produced for Inspection by Dell Inc., Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc., Hitachi Ltd., Western Digital Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fulghum, Roger)
July 13, 2011 Filing 478 Emergency SEALED PATENT MOTION to Compel Convolve, Inc. to Return Privileged Document HGSTC0006046291-7 Pursuant to the Protective Order by Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc., Hitachi Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(Young, Patricia)
July 13, 2011 Filing 477 STIPULATION Stipulation of the Parties regarding Certain Physical Exhibits and Defendants' Motion to Strike Portions of Convolve's Expert Reports (Docket No. 443) by Convolve, Inc.. (Albritton, Eric)
July 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 476 ORDER - The court sua sponte ORDERS that Plaintiff Convolve, Inc. will have fifteen hours to try its case and Defendants collectively will have eighteen hours to try their case. This time is exclusive of the parties opening statements and closing arguments, but inclusive of the parties respective direct examinations, cross examinations, and deposition designations. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/13/2011. (ch, )
July 12, 2011 Filing 484 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham: Evidentiary Hearing held on 7/12/2011. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR.) (Attachments: #1 Attorney Sign-in Sheet) (jml)
July 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 475 ORDER denying #337 Sealed Motion for summary judgment of noninfringement in its entirety.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/12/11. (ehs, )
July 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 474 ORDER denying #332 Sealed Motion for summary judgment of non-infringement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/12/11. (ehs, )
July 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 473 ORDER re #272 Opposed SEALED MOTION Plaintiff Convolve, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Defendant Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc. and Hitachi LTD to Supplement its Interrogatory Responses and Produce Deposition Witnesses filed by Convolve, Inc.. The court DENIES Plaintiffs request that the court compel Hitachi to supplement its interrogatory responses.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/12/11. (ehs, )
July 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 472 ORDER denying #333 Sealed Motion for Summary Judgment. The court DENIES Defendants motion for summary judgment of invalidity in its entirety. (see order for details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/12/2011. (ch, )
July 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 471 ORDER denying #336 Sealed Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement. Court DENIES Western Digitals motion for summary judgment of non-infringement in its entirety. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/12/2011. (ch, )
July 11, 2011 Filing 470 RESPONSE to #456 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) PLAINTIFF CONVOLVE, INC.'S RESPONSE TO WESTERN DIGITAL'S NOTICE TO THE COURT REGARDING WILFULNESS (DOCKET NO. 456) by Convolve, Inc.. (Thomas, Elizabeth)
July 11, 2011 Filing 469 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of PRE-TRIAL HEARING held on 7/5/11 before Judge Chad Everingham. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR,Telephone number: (903) 663-5082. (66 Pages)NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/4/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/15/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/14/2011. (tja, )
July 11, 2011 ***FILED IN ERROR, WRONG EVENT USED, ATTY MUST REFILE. Document # 465, Notice. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (sm, )
July 10, 2011 Filing 468 REPLY to Response to Motion re #443 SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion to Strike the Portions of Convolve's Expert Reports That Are Based on Testing of Devices That Were Not Produced for Inspection filed by Dell Inc., Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc., Hitachi Ltd., Western Digital Corporation. (Fulghum, Roger)
July 10, 2011 Filing 467 SEALED MOTION WESTERN DIGITAL'S SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION IN LIMINE TO LIMIT REFERENCES TO THE CENSTOR LICENSES BY CONVOLVE AND ITS WITNESSES by Western Digital Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Wessel, Bruce)
July 9, 2011 Filing 466 Supplemental MOTION in Limine on McFarlane Testimony Concerning Royalty Rate Reflected in Altec Lansing License by Dell Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fulghum, Roger)
July 8, 2011 Filing 465 ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE.***NOTICE by Convolve, Inc. re #456 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) PLAINTIFF CONVOLVE, INC.S RESPONSE TO WESTERN DIGITALS NOTICE TO THE COURT REGARDING WILLFULNESS (DOCKET NO. 456) (Thomas, Elizabeth) Modified on 7/11/2011 (sm, ).
July 8, 2011 Filing 464 SEALED RESPONSE PLAINTIFF CONVOLVE, INC.S RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO STRIKE THE PORTIONS OF CONVOLVES EXPERT REPORTS THAT ARE BASED ON TESTING OF DEVICES THAT WERE NOT PRODUCED FOR INSPECTION (DOCKET NO. 443) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(Thomas, Elizabeth)
July 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 463 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #323 Sealed Motion to exclude the expert testimony and strike the expert reports. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/8/11. (ehs, )
July 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 462 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #338 Motion to Strike expert report and testimony. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/8/11. (ehs, )
July 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 461 ORDER denying #330 Sealed Motion motion for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Donald E. Walter on 7/8/11. (ehs, )
July 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 460 ORDER denying #334 Sealed Motion to exclude the survey and expert report of Dr. Kent Van Liere. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/8/11. (ehs, )
July 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 459 ORDER denying #329 Motion to exclude the expert report of Dr. Gregory K. Leonard. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/8/11. (ehs, )
July 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 458 ORDER denying #328 Sealed Motion to exclude portions of the expert report. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/8/11. (ehs, )
July 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 457 ORDER denying #324 Sealed Motion for summary judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/8/11. (ehs, )
July 7, 2011 Filing 456 NOTICE by Western Digital Corporation Western Digital's Notice To Court Re Convolve's Willfulness Allegations and Western Digital's Proffered Willfulness Expert (Attachments: #1 SJM v. ACI, #2 Tyco Healthcare v. Applied Med.)(Wessel, Bruce)
July 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 455 ORDER denying #327 Sealed Motion. The court, however, notes that if Mr. Bakewell attempts to incorporate the royalty rates underlying the White licenses into his testimony in front of the jury, Dell must first establish the comparability of licenses. It is not sufficient to state that both the 473 Patent and the patents underlying the White licenses cover hard disk drive technology. Rather, Dell must establish the functionality enabled by the 473 Patent, as well as the functionality purportedly covered by the licensed patent, and compare their economic importance.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/7/11. (ehs, )
July 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 454 ORDER denying #326 Sealed Motion to exclude or, in the alternative, to strike the expert testimony and expert report of Dr. John Levy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/7/11. (ehs, )
July 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 453 ORDER granting #440 Motion in Limine. Defendant Western Digital Corp.s Western Digital) supplemental motion in limine concerning the late identified Western Digital 481 Patent and its prosecution (Dkt. No. 440).. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/7/11. (ehs, )
July 5, 2011 Filing 452 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham: Jury Selection held on 7/5/2011, Evidentiary Hearing held on 7/5/2011. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR.) (jml)
July 5, 2011 Filing 451 DEFENDANT HITACHI, LTD.S SEALED ANSWER TO CONVOLVE, INC.S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND COUNTERCLAIMS(Lang, Jeremy)
July 5, 2011 Filing 450 DEFENDANT HITACHI GLOBAL STORAGE TECHNOLOGIES, INC.S SEALED ANSWER TO CONVOLVE, INC.S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND COUNTERCLAIMS(Lang, Jeremy)
July 5, 2011 Filing 449 ANSWER to Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM Dell Inc.'s Answer and Counterclaims to Convolve's Second Amended Complaint against Convolve, Inc. by Dell Inc..(Fulghum, Roger)
July 5, 2011 Filing 448 ANSWER to Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM Western Digital Corporation's Answer and Counterclaims to Convolve's Second Amended Complaint against Convolve, Inc. by Western Digital Corporation.(Smith, Melissa)
July 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 447 ORDER granting #444 Motion to Expedite briefing. Briefing schedule on Defendants Motion to Strike Portions of Convolves Expert Reports, Docket No. 443, be entered: Convolves Response to be filed Friday, July 8, 2011. Defendants Reply to be filed Sunday, July 10, 2011. Convolves Sur-Reply to be filed Wednesday, July 13, 2011.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/5/11. (ehs, )
July 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 446 ORDER - the court GRANTS Defendants motion in limine to preclude all testimony and evidence related to Dell computers incorporating Seagate hard disk drives.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/5/11. (ehs, )
July 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 445 ORDER granting #262 Motion for clarification of the court's construction of the term "data storage device" ; denying #325 Sealed Motion for summary judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/5/11. (ehs, )
July 1, 2011 Filing 444 Agreed MOTION to Expedite Briefing on Defendants' Motion to Strike Portions of Convolve's Expert Reports (Docket No. 443) by Dell Inc., Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc., Hitachi Ltd., Western Digital Corporation. (Fulghum, Roger) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/5/2011: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (sm, ).
July 1, 2011 Filing 443 ***WITHDRAWN PER ORDER #489 *** SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion to Strike the Portions of Convolve's Expert Reports That Are Based on Testing of Devices That Were Not Produced for Inspection by Dell Inc., Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc., Hitachi Ltd., Western Digital Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Text of Proposed Order)(Fulghum, Roger) Modified on 7/15/2011 (ehs, ).
July 1, 2011 Filing 442 NOTICE of Hearing: Jury Selection RESET for 7/5/2011, 01:30 PM, in Mag Ctrm (Marshall) before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham. Evidentiary hearing regarding trial exhibits and deposition designations to follow immediately after jury selection. (delat, )
July 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 441 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #401 , #412 and #414 Sealed Motion in Limine. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/1/11. (ehs, )
July 1, 2011 Filing 440 MOTION in Limine CONCERNING THE LATE-IDENTIFIED WESTERN DIGITAL '481 PATENT AND ITS PROSECUTION AND OBJECTION TO CONVOLVE EXHIBITS PTX-576 AND PTX-798 (CORRECTED) by Western Digital Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Birnholz, Richard) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/5/2011: #5 REVISED PROPOSED ORDER) (sm, ).
July 1, 2011 Filing 439 ***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY. PLEASE IGNORE.*** MOTION in Limine CONCERNING THE LATE-IDENTIFIED WESTERN DIGITAL '481 PATENT AND ITS PROSECUTION AND OBJECTION TO CONVOLVE EXHIBITS PTX-576 AND PTX-798 by Western Digital Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Birnholz, Richard) Modified on 7/1/2011 (ch, ).
July 1, 2011 ***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY Document # 439, Motion in Limine. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
June 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 438 ORDER denying #295 Sealed Motion. The court DENIES Plaintiffs motion to strike such references. Although Hitachi and Western Digital have continued to offer the drives for Plaintiffs inspection, the court explicitly grants Plaintiff the opportunity to inspect the exact Hawk drive that Hitachi acquired and Dr. Sidman relied upon, as well as the WDAL2200 drive that Western Digital discovered. The court also grants Plaintiff the opportunity tosupplement its rebuttal expert reports. Any such supplements shall be limited to information gleaned from the inspection of the drives and shall be served by July 11, 2011.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/29/11. (ehs, )
June 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 437 ORDER granting #272 Sealed Motion. The court ORDERS Hitachi to produce the witness(es) it designates in Hawaii at a mutually agreeable time and date during the week of either July 4, 2011 or July 11, 2011. The court will issue a separate order addressing Convolves motion to compel Hitachi to supplement its interrogatories.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/28/11. (ehs, )
June 27, 2011 Filing 436 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of PRETRIAL HEARING held on 6/23/11 before Judge Chad Everingham. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kimberly Julian, Sunbelt Reporting,Telephone number: (713) 667-0763. (42 Pages)NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/21/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/1/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/29/2011. (tja, )
June 24, 2011 Filing 435 Sealed Document, Dell's Memorandum In Support of Oral Motion for Clarification of the Court's Ruling on Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 1, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Fulghum, Roger)
June 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 433 ORDER granting #427 Motion for Leave to exceed the page limit on its objections to Deft's Motion in Limine. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/24/11. (ehs, )
June 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 432 ORDER granting #422 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff Convolve's Unopposed Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limit on its Objections to Defendants' Motions in Limine (Dkt. Nos. 404 and 415)Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff Convolve's Unopposed Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limit on its Objections to Defendants' Motions in Limine (Dkt. Nos. 404 and 415) filed by Convolve, Inc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/24/11. (ehs, )
June 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 431 ORDER granting #417 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. The page limit for Defendants' Oppositions to Convolve's Motions in Limine be exceeded by seven (7) pages, bringing the page limit up to and including twenty-two (22) pages.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/24/11. (ehs, )
June 23, 2011 Filing 434 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 6/23/2011. (Court Reporter Kim Julian, CSR.) (Attachments: #1 Attorney Sign-in Sheet) (jml)
June 23, 2011 Filing 430 SEALED SUR-REPLY to Motion (Dkt. No. 308) SEALED MOTION , Defendants' Motion for Spoliation Sanctions Arising Out of Convolve's Destruction of Documents, filed by Convolve, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit H, #2 Exhibit I, #3 Exhibit J)(Thomas, Elizabeth)
June 23, 2011 Filing 429 NOTICE of Hearing: Evidentiary Hearing regarding Trial Exhibits and Deposition Designations set for 7/5/2011 11:00 AM (Immediately following Jury Selection) in Mag Ctrm (Marshall) before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham. (jml)
June 23, 2011 Filing 428 NOTICE by Dell Inc. of Request for Daily Transcripts of Court Proceedings (Fulghum, Roger)
June 23, 2011 Filing 427 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff Convolve's Unopposed Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limits on its Objections to Defendants' Motions in Limine by Convolve, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Thomas, Elizabeth)
June 23, 2011 Filing 426 SEALED RESPONSE - Convolve's Objections to Defendants' Motions in Limine (Dkt. Nos. 404 and 414) filed by Convolve, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Thomas, Elizabeth)
June 23, 2011 Filing 425 NOTICE by Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc., Hitachi Ltd. of Request for Daily Transcript and Real Time Reporting of Court Proceedings (Craft, Roger)
June 23, 2011 Filing 424 NOTICE by Western Digital Corporation of Request for Daily Transcripts of Court Proceedings (Smith, Melissa)
June 23, 2011 Filing 423 NOTICE by Convolve, Inc. Plaintiff's Notice of Request for Daily Transcripts of Court Proceedings (Albritton, Eric)
June 23, 2011 NOTICE of DEFICIENCY regarding the #422 Motion to exceed page limit submitted by Convolve, Inc.. No atty signature (incomplete) and no certificate of service included. Correction should be made by 1 business day and refiled. This motion is now terminated. (sm, )
June 23, 2011 ***FILED IN ERROR, WRONG EVENT USED, ATTY MUST REFILE. Document # 421, Sealed Document. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (sm, )
June 22, 2011 Filing 422 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT, PLEASE IGNORE.***Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff Convolve's Unopposed Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limit on its Objections to Defendants' Motions in Limine (Dkt. Nos. 404 and 415) by Convolve, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Thomas, Elizabeth) Modified on 6/23/2011 (sm, ).
June 22, 2011 Filing 421 ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE.***Sealed -- Convolve's Objections To Defendants' Motions In Limine (Dkt. Nos. 404 and 415) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Convolve's Objections To Defendants' Motions In Limine (Dkt. Nos. 404 and 415), #2 Exhibit 2 to Convolve's Objections To Defendants' Motions In Limine (Dkt. Nos. 404 and 415), #3 Exhibit 3 to Convolve's Objections To Defendants' Motions In Limine (Dkt. Nos. 404 and 415), #4 Exhibit 4 to Convolve's Objections To Defendants' Motions In Limine (Dkt. Nos. 404 and 415), #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Thomas, Elizabeth) Modified on 6/23/2011 (sm, ).
June 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 420 SEALED ORDER granting in part denying in part #271 Sealed Motion; graning in part denying in part #305 Sealed Motion (see order for details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/22/2011. (ch, ) Modified on 6/22/2011 (ch, ).
June 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 419 ORDER granting #414 Motion for leave to exceed the page limit on its Omnibus motion in Limine. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/22/11. (ehs, )
June 22, 2011 Filing 418 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #412 SEALED MOTION Plaintiff Convolve's Omnibus Motion in Limine filed by Dell Inc., Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc., Hitachi Ltd., Western Digital Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Text of Proposed Order)(Wessel, Bruce)
June 22, 2011 Filing 417 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Defendants' Responses to Convolve's Motions in Limine Nos. 1-21 by Dell Inc., Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc., Hitachi Ltd., Western Digital Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wessel, Bruce)
June 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 416 ORDER granting #405 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages for Defendants Motions in Limine Nos. 1 24. ORDERED that the page limit for Defendants Motions in Limine Nos. 1 24 is exceeded by eleven (11) pages, bringing the page limit up to and including twenty-six (26) pages.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/22/11. (ehs, )
June 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 415 ORDER granting #390 Motion to Amend docket control order. Parties to file motions in Limine deadline has not changed. Parties to file Proposed Joint Pretrial Order, Proposed Jury Instructions and Joint Verdict Forms deadline extended to 7/20/11. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/22/11. (ehs, )
June 21, 2011 Filing 414 Supplemental MOTION in Limine Concerning the Late-Identified Colligan Patent Application by Dell Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fulghum, Roger)
June 21, 2011 Filing 413 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff Convolve's Unopposed Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limit on its Omnibus Motion in Limine (Docket No. 412) by Convolve, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Albritton, Eric)
June 21, 2011 Filing 412 SEALED MOTION Plaintiff Convolve's Omnibus Motion in Limine by Convolve, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Text of Proposed Order)(Albritton, Eric)
June 21, 2011 Filing 411 NOTICE of Hearing: Pretrial Conference RESET for 6/23/2011, 03:30 PM, in Mag Ctrm (Marshall) before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham. (delat, )
June 21, 2011 NOTICE FROM CLERK re #407 Proposed Findings of Fact. This entry has been modified to reflect that it is Convolve's Proposed Jury Verdict. (sm, )
June 21, 2011 NOTICE FROM CLERK re #410 Proposed Findings of Fact. Entry has been modified by clerk to reflect that it is a proposed jury verdict. (sm, )
June 20, 2011 Filing 410 Proposed Jury Verdict by Dell Inc., Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc., Hitachi Ltd., Western Digital Corporation. (Lumish, Douglas) Modified on 6/21/2011 (sm, ).
June 20, 2011 Filing 409 Proposed Jury Instructions by Dell Inc., Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc., Hitachi Ltd., Western Digital Corporation. (Lumish, Douglas)
June 20, 2011 Filing 408 Proposed Jury Instructions by Convolve, Inc.. (Anderson, A)
June 20, 2011 Filing 407 Proposed Jury Verdict by Convolve, Inc.. (Anderson, A) Modified on 6/21/2011 (sm, ).
June 20, 2011 Filing 406 Sealed Joint Pre-Trial Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Joint Pre-trial Order, #2 Exhibit B to Joint Pre-trial Order, #3 Exhibit C to Joint Pre-trial Order, #4 Exhibit D to Joint Pre-trial Order, #5 Exhibit E to Joint Pre-trial Order, #6 Exhibit F to Joint Pre-trial Order)(Anderson, A)
June 20, 2011 Filing 405 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Defendants' Motions in Limine Nos. 1 - 24 by Dell Inc., Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc., Hitachi Ltd., Western Digital Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
June 20, 2011 Filing 404 Opposed SEALED MOTION - Defendants' Motions in Limine Nos. 1 - 24 by Dell Inc., Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc., Hitachi Ltd., Western Digital Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Excerpts from Singer Depo of March 22, 2011, #2 Exhibit B - DiEuliis Report Excerpts, #3 Exhibit C - Excerpts from Singer Depo of March 23, 2011, #4 Exhibit D - CV-010948, #5 Exhibit E - Dec 11 - 12 Meeting Minutes, #6 Exhibit F - Expert Discovery Email, #7 Exhibit G - 2011-05-19 DiEuliis, Val Minuscript, #8 Exhibit H - 2011-05-20- DiEuliis, Val Minuscript, #9 Exhibit I - Hitachi's Objections and Responses to Convolve's 2nd Set of Rogs, #10 Exhibit J - Expert Report of Michael Sidman on Non-Infringement of Patent No. 6,314,473, #11 Exhibit K - Dell CV 0023898, #12 Exhibit L - Convolve's Responses to Hitachi's Second Interrogatories, #13 Exhibit M - Attachments to Convolve's Contentions, #14 Exhibit N - 2003 Letter, #15 Exhibit O - IBM Subpoena, #16 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
June 20, 2011 Filing 403 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #338 MOTION to Strike and Exclude the Expert Testimony and Expert Report of Seth T. Kaplan, Ph.D. filed by Dell Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Fulghum, Roger)
June 20, 2011 NOTICE of DEFICIENCY regarding the #400 and #401 Motions in limine submitted by Convolve, Inc., Dell Inc.. No certificate of conference included; exceeds the page limit. Correction should be made by 1 business day and refiled. These motions are now terminated. (sm, )
June 17, 2011 Filing 402 SEALED SUR-REPLY to Motion re #334 SEALED MOTION To Exclude Survey And Expert Report Of Dr. Kent Van Liere For Failure To Comply With Federal Rules Of Evidence 702 And 403 filed by Convolve, Inc.. (Thomas, Elizabeth)
June 17, 2011 Filing 401 ****DEFICIENT DOCUMENT, PLEASE IGNORE.***SEALED MOTION IN LIMINE (Nos. 1 - 24) by Dell Inc., Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc., Hitachi Ltd., Western Digital Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Text of Proposed Order)(Wessel, Bruce) Modified on 6/20/2011 (sm, ).
June 17, 2011 Filing 400 S***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT, PLEASE IGNORE.*** SEALED MOTION IN LIMINE by Convolve, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Text of Proposed Order)(Albritton, Eric) Modified on 6/20/2011 (sm, ).
June 17, 2011 Filing 399 SEALED SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #337 SEALED MOTION Hitachi Ltd. and Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement filed by Convolve, Inc.. (Anderson, A)
June 17, 2011 Filing 398 SEALED SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #336 SEALED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT (CORRECTED) SEALED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT (CORRECTED) filed by Convolve, Inc.. (Anderson, A)
June 17, 2011 Filing 397 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #329 MOTION Exclude the Expert Report of Dr. Gregory K. Leonard filed by Convolve, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3 to Sur-Reply in Support of Opposition to Motion to Exclude Leonard)(Anderson, A)
June 17, 2011 Filing 396 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re #323 SEALED MOTION DAUBERT MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE EXPERT TESTIMONY AND STRIKE THE EXPERT REPORTS OF DANIEL J. SLOTTJE AND KEITH R. UGONE filed by Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc., Hitachi Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Homrig, Jeffrey)
June 17, 2011 Filing 395 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re #326 SEALED MOTION PLAINTIFF CONVOLVE, INC.S MOTION TO EXCLUDE OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO STRIKE THE EXPERT TESTIMONY AND EXPERT REPORT OF DR. JOHN LEVY filed by Dell Inc., Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc., Hitachi Ltd., Western Digital Corporation. (Wessel, Bruce)
June 17, 2011 Filing 394 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re #323 SEALED MOTION DAUBERT MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE EXPERT TESTIMONY AND STRIKE THE EXPERT REPORTS OF DANIEL J. SLOTTJE AND KEITH R. UGONE filed by Western Digital Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C)(Wessel, Bruce)
June 17, 2011 Filing 393 SEALED SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #330 SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Damages filed by Convolve, Inc.. (Anderson, A)
June 17, 2011 Filing 392 SEALED SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #324 SEALED MOTION Dell's Motion for Summary Judgment on Convolve's Claim of Willful Infringement for US Patent No. 6,314,473 filed by Convolve, Inc.. (Anderson, A)
June 17, 2011 Filing 391 SEALED SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #333 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment that the Asserted Claims of the '473 Patent are Invalid filed by Convolve, Inc.. (Anderson, A)
June 17, 2011 Filing 390 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct the Docket Control Order by Western Digital Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wessel, Bruce)
June 17, 2011 Filing 389 SEALED SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #325 SEALED MOTION , Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement of Claims 7-10, 14 and 15 of US Patent No. 6,314,473 Based on the "To The Data Storage Device" Limitation filed by Convolve, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Convolve's Sur-Reply in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of NonInfringement of Claims 7-10, 14 and 15, #2 Exhibit 2 to Convolve's Sur-Reply in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of NonInfringement of Claims 7-10, 14 and 15, #3 Exhibit 3 to Convolve's Sur-Reply in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of NonInfringement of Claims 7-10, 14 and 15, #4 Exhibit 4 to Convolve's Sur-Reply in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of NonInfringement of Claims 7-10, 14 and 15)(Anderson, A) Modified on 6/20/2011 (sm, ).
June 17, 2011 Filing 388 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #327 SEALED MOTION PLAINTIFF CONVOLVE, INC.S DAUBERT MOTION TO EXCLUDE THAT PORTION OF THE EXPERT REPORT AND TESTIMONY OF W. CHRISTOPHER BAKEWELL WHICH RELIES ON THE WHITE LICENSES filed by Dell Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D)(Fulghum, Roger)
June 16, 2011 Filing 387 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #295 Opposed SEALED MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF DR. BUCKMAN'S AND DR. SIDMAN'S EXPERT REPORTS ON INVALIDITY OF THE '473 PATENT filed by Western Digital Corporation. (Wessel, Bruce)
June 16, 2011 Filing 386 SEALED SUR-REPLY in Opposition to Motion re #295 Opposed SEALED MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF DR. BUCKMAN'S AND DR. SIDMAN'S EXPERT REPORTS ON INVALIDITY OF THE '473 PATENT filed by Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc., Hitachi Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Lang, Jeremy)
June 16, 2011 Filing 385 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #295 Opposed SEALED MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF DR. BUCKMAN'S AND DR. SIDMAN'S EXPERT REPORTS ON INVALIDITY OF THE '473 PATENT filed by Dell Inc.. (Fulghum, Roger)
June 15, 2011 Filing 384 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #338 MOTION to Strike and Exclude the Expert Testimony and Expert Report of Seth T. Kaplan, Ph.D. filed by Convolve, Inc.. (Thomas, Elizabeth)
June 15, 2011 Filing 383 Sealed Document. Plaintiff Convolve, Inc. Second Amended Complaint against Dell Inc., Western Digital Corporation, Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc., and Hitachi Ltd. Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T) Albritton, Eric)
June 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 382 ORDER granting #381 Motion to Amend/Correct. Deadline for Parties to file Proposed Joint Final Pretrial Order, Proposed Jury Instructions, Joint Verdict Forms and Motions in Limine. Prior to initial pretrial conference, parties shall confer with each other regarding the other party's Motion in Limine, deposition designations, and exhibit and shall submit to the Court in writing any objections they may have to the other party's Motions in Limine, deposition designations, and exhibits is Friday, June 17, 2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on June 15, 2011. (jml)
June 14, 2011 Filing 381 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct The Docket Control Order by Convolve, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order for Joint Motion to Amend the Docket Control Order)(Halsey, Anna)
June 13, 2011 Filing 380 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #327 SEALED MOTION PLAINTIFF CONVOLVE, INC.S DAUBERT MOTION TO EXCLUDE THAT PORTION OF THE EXPERT REPORT AND TESTIMONY OF W. CHRISTOPHER BAKEWELL WHICH RELIES ON THE WHITE LICENSES filed by Convolve, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Thomas, Elizabeth)
June 13, 2011 Filing 379 SEALED REPLY In Support of its Motion re #337 SEALED MOTION Hitachi Ltd. and Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement filed by Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc., Hitachi Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit O, #2 Exhibit P)(Lumish, Douglas)
June 13, 2011 Filing 378 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #326 SEALED MOTION PLAINTIFF CONVOLVE, INC.S MOTION TO EXCLUDE OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO STRIKE THE EXPERT TESTIMONY AND EXPERT REPORT OF DR. JOHN LEVY filed by Convolve, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 10, #2 Exhibit 11)(Thomas, Elizabeth)
June 13, 2011 Filing 377 SEALED REPLY In Support of Motion re #333 Joint SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment that the Asserted Claims of the '473 Patent are Invalid filed by Dell Inc., Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc., Hitachi Ltd., Western Digital Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit P)(Homrig, Jeffrey)
June 13, 2011 Filing 376 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #323 SEALED MOTION DAUBERT MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE EXPERT TESTIMONY AND STRIKE THE EXPERT REPORTS OF DANIEL J. SLOTTJE AND KEITH R. UGONE filed by Convolve, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Thomas, Elizabeth)
June 13, 2011 Filing 375 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #323 SEALED MOTION DAUBERT MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE EXPERT TESTIMONY AND STRIKE THE EXPERT REPORTS OF DANIEL J. SLOTTJE AND KEITH R. UGONE filed by Convolve, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Thomas, Elizabeth)
June 13, 2011 Filing 374 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #336 SEALED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT (CORRECTED) SEALED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT (CORRECTED) filed by Western Digital Corporation. (Birnholz, Richard)
June 13, 2011 Filing 373 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #334 SEALED MOTION To Exclude Survey And Expert Report Of Dr. Kent Van Liere For Failure To Comply With Federal Rules Of Evidence 702 And 403 filed by Dell Inc., Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc., Hitachi Ltd., Western Digital Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Evidentiary Objections to Tanquary and Thomas Declarations)(Wessel, Bruce)
June 13, 2011 Filing 372 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #328 SEALED MOTION TO EXCLUDE PORTIONS OF THE EXPERT REPORT AND PROPOSED EXPERT TESTIMONY OF CONVOLVE EXPERT BRUCE MCFARLANE filed by Dell Inc., Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc., Hitachi Ltd., Western Digital Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B, #2 Exhibit C, #3 Exhibit D, #4 Exhibit E, #5 Exhibit F)(Wessel, Bruce)
June 13, 2011 Filing 371 REPLY to Response to Motion re #325 SEALED MOTION , Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement of Claims 7-10, 14 and 15 of US Patent No. 6,314,473 Based on the "To The Data Storage Device" Limitation filed by Dell Inc., Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc., Hitachi Ltd., Western Digital Corporation. (Fulghum, Roger)
June 13, 2011 Filing 370 Defendants' SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #308 SEALED MOTION , Defendants' Motion for Spoliation Sanctions Arising Out of Convolve's Destruction of Documents, filed by Dell Inc., Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc., Hitachi Ltd., Western Digital Corporation. (Fulghum, Roger)
June 13, 2011 Filing 369 Defendants'SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #330 SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Damages filed by Dell Inc., Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc., Hitachi Ltd., Western Digital Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit M, #2 Exhibit N, #3 Exhibit O, #4 Exhibit P, #5 Exhibit Q)(Fulghum, Roger)
June 13, 2011 Filing 368 REPLY to Response to Motion re #324 SEALED MOTION Dell's Motion for Summary Judgment on Convolve's Claim of Willful Infringement for US Patent No. 6,314,473 filed by Dell Inc.. (Fulghum, Roger)
June 13, 2011 Filing 367 REPLY to Response to Motion re #329 MOTION Exclude the Expert Report of Dr. Gregory K. Leonard filed by Dell Inc., Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc., Hitachi Ltd., Western Digital Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Fulghum, Roger)
June 13, 2011 Filing 366 SEALED REPLY to Convolve's Response to Motion re #332 SEALED MOTION CORRECTED MOTION - Dell Inc's Motion for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement of Claims 7 and 10 of US Patent 6,314,473 filed by Dell Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Fulghum, Roger)
June 10, 2011 Filing 365 RESPONSE to Motion re #338 MOTION to Strike and Exclude the Expert Testimony and Expert Report of Seth T. Kaplan, Ph.D. filed by Dell Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Text of Proposed Order)(Fulghum, Roger)
June 9, 2011 Filing 364 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Tara S G Sharp for Convolve, Inc. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-546. (ch, )
June 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 363 ORDER granting #266 Motion for Protective Order to preclude discovery from plaintiff's non-testifying experts. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/8/2011. (ch, )
June 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 362 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #200 Sealed Motion; granting in part and denying in part #226 Sealed Motion; granting in part and denying in part #243 Sealed Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/8/2011. (ch, )
June 8, 2011 Filing 361 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document (Exhibit 1 contained in main document): #357 Sealed Response to Motion,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2 to Convolve's Opposition to Western Digital's Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Exhibit 3 to Convolve's Opposition to Western Digital's Motion for Summary Judgment, #3 Exhibit 4 to Convolve's Opposition to Western Digital's Motion for Summary Judgment, #4 Exhibit 5 to Convolve's Opposition to Western Digital's Motion for Summary Judgment, #5 Exhibit 6 to Convolve's Opposition to Western Digital's Motion for Summary Judgment, #6 Exhibit 7 to Convolve's Opposition to Western Digital's Motion for Summary Judgment, #7 Exhibit 8 to Convolve's Opposition to Western Digital's Motion for Summary Judgment, #8 Exhibit 9 to Convolve's Opposition to Western Digital's Motion for Summary Judgment, #9 Exhibit 10 to Convolve's Opposition to Western Digital's Motion for Summary Judgment, #10 Exhibit 11 to Convolve's Opposition to Western Digital's Motion for Summary Judgment, #11 Exhibit 12 to Convolve's Opposition to Western Digital's Motion for Summary Judgment, #12 Exhibit 13 to Convolve's Opposition to Western Digital's Motion for Summary Judgment, #13 Exhibit 14 to Convolve's Opposition to Western Digital's Motion for Summary Judgment, #14 Exhibit 15 to Convolve's Opposition to Western Digital's Motion for Summary Judgment, #15 Exhibit 16 to Convolve's Opposition to Western Digital's Motion for Summary Judgment, #16 Exhibit 17 to Convolve's Opposition to Western Digital's Motion for Summary Judgment, #17 Exhibit 18 to Convolve's Opposition to Western Digital's Motion for Summary Judgment, #18 Exhibit 19 to Convolve's Opposition to Western Digital's Motion for Summary Judgment, #19 Exhibit 20 to Convolve's Opposition to Western Digital's Motion for Summary Judgment, #20 Exhibit 21 to Convolve's Opposition to Western Digital's Motion for Summary Judgment, #21 Exhibit 22 to Convolve's Opposition to Western Digital's Motion for Summary Judgment, #22 Exhibit 23 to Convolve's Opposition to Western Digital's Motion for Summary Judgment, #23 Exhibit 24 to Convolve's Opposition to Western Digital's Motion for Summary Judgment, #24 Exhibit 25 to Convolve's Opposition to Western Digital's Motion for Summary Judgment, #25 Exhibit 26 to Convolve's Opposition to Western Digital's Motion for Summary Judgment, #26 Exhibit 27 to Convolve's Opposition to Western Digital's Motion for Summary Judgment, #27 Exhibit 28 to Convolve's Opposition to Western Digital's Motion for Summary Judgment, #28 Exhibit 29 to Convolve's Opposition to Western Digital's Motion for Summary Judgment, #29 Exhibit 30 to Convolve's Opposition to Western Digital's Motion for Summary Judgment)(Thomas, Elizabeth) Modified on 6/8/2011 (sm, ).
June 8, 2011 Filing 360 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document (Exhibit 1 contained in Main Document): #355 Sealed Response to Motion,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2 to Convolve's Opposition to Hitachi's Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Exhibit 3 to Convolve's Opposition to Hitachi's Motion for Summary Judgment, #3 Exhibit 4 to Convolve's Opposition to Hitachi's Motion for Summary Judgment, #4 Exhibit 5 to Convolve's Opposition to Hitachi's Motion for Summary Judgment, #5 Exhibit 6 to Convolve's Opposition to Hitachi's Motion for Summary Judgment, #6 Exhibit 7 to Convolve's Opposition to Hitachi's Motion for Summary Judgment, #7 Exhibit 8 to Convolve's Opposition to Hitachi's Motion for Summary Judgment, #8 Exhibit 9 to Convolve's Opposition to Hitachi's Motion for Summary Judgment, #9 Exhibit 10 to Convolve's Opposition to Hitachi's Motion for Summary Judgment, #10 Exhibit 11 to Convolve's Opposition to Hitachi's Motion for Summary Judgment, #11 Exhibit 12 to Convolve's Opposition to Hitachi's Motion for Summary Judgment, #12 Exhibit 13 to Convolve's Opposition to Hitachi's Motion for Summary Judgment, #13 Exhibit 14 to Convolve's Opposition to Hitachi's Motion for Summary Judgment, #14 Exhibit 15 to Convolve's Opposition to Hitachi's Motion for Summary Judgment, #15 Exhibit 16 to Convolve's Opposition to Hitachi's Motion for Summary Judgment, #16 Exhibit 17 to Convolve's Opposition to Hitachi's Motion for Summary Judgment, #17 Exhibit 18 to Convolve's Opposition to Hitachi's Motion for Summary Judgment, #18 Exhibit 19 to Convolve's Opposition to Hitachi's Motion for Summary Judgment, #19 Exhibit 20 to Convolve's Opposition to Hitachi's Motion for Summary Judgment, #20 Exhibit 21 to Convolve's Opposition to Hitachi's Motion for Summary Judgment, #21 Exhibit 22 to Convolve's Opposition to Hitachi's Motion for Summary Judgment, #22 Exhibit 23 to Convolve's Opposition to Hitachi's Motion for Summary Judgment, #23 Exhibit 24 to Convolve's Opposition to Hitachi's Motion for Summary Judgment, #24 Exhibit 25 to Convolve's Opposition to Hitachi's Motion for Summary Judgment, #25 Exhibit 26 to Convolve's Opposition to Hitachi's Motion for Summary Judgment, #26 Exhibit 27 to Convolve's Opposition to Hitachi's Motion for Summary Judgment, #27 Exhibit 28 to Convolve's Opposition to Hitachi's Motion for Summary Judgment, #28 Exhibit 29 to Convolve's Opposition to Hitachi's Motion for Summary Judgment)(Thomas, Elizabeth) Modified on 6/8/2011 (sm, ).
June 8, 2011 Filing 359 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document (Exhibit 8 contained in main document): #352 Sealed Response to Motion,,. (Anderson, A) Modified on 6/8/2011 (sm, ).
June 8, 2011 Filing 358 Additional Attachments to Main Document (EXHIBIT 2 contained in main document): #354 Response in Opposition to Motion.. (Anderson, A) Modified on 6/8/2011 (sm, ).
June 8, 2011 Filing 357 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #336 SEALED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT (CORRECTED) SEALED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT (CORRECTED) filed by Convolve, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order for Response in Opposiiton to Western Digital Corporation's Motion for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement)(Thomas, Elizabeth)
June 8, 2011 Filing 356 SEALED RESPONSE and Memorandum of Law by Plaintiff Convolve, Inc. to Motion re #332 SEALED MOTION CORRECTED MOTION - Dell Inc's Motion for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement of Claims 7 and 10 of US Patent 6,314,473 filed by Convolve, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Text of Proposed Order)(Anderson, A)
June 8, 2011 Filing 355 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #337 SEALED MOTION Hitachi Ltd. and Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement filed by Convolve, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order to Response in Opp to Defs Hitachi's Motion for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement)(Thomas, Elizabeth)
June 7, 2011 Filing 354 RESPONSE in Opposition re #329 MOTION Exclude the Expert Report of Dr. Gregory K. Leonard filed by Convolve, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Anderson, A)
June 7, 2011 Filing 353 SEALED RESPONSE by Plaintiff Convolve, Inc. in Opposition to Motion re #334 SEALED MOTION To Exclude Survey And Expert Report Of Dr. Kent Van Liere For Failure To Comply With Federal Rules Of Evidence 702 And 403 filed by Convolve, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Text of Proposed Order)(Anderson, A)
June 7, 2011 Filing 352 SEALED RESPONSE and Memorandum of Law by Plaintiff Convolve, Inc. to Motion re #325 SEALED MOTION , Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement of Claims 7-10, 14 and 15 of US Patent No. 6,314,473 Based on the "To The Data Storage Device" Limitation filed by Convolve, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4 (Part 1 of 2), #5 Exhibit 4 (Part 2 of 2), #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Text of Proposed Order)(Anderson, A)
June 7, 2011 Filing 351 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #328 SEALED MOTION TO EXCLUDE PORTIONS OF THE EXPERT REPORT AND PROPOSED EXPERT TESTIMONY OF CONVOLVE EXPERT BRUCE MCFARLANE filed by Convolve, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude Portions of the Expert Report and Proposed Testimony of Convolve Expert Bruce McFarlane, #2 Exhibit 2 to Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude Portions of the Expert Report and Proposed Testimony of Convolve Expert Bruce McFarlane, #3 Text of Proposed Order for Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude Portions of the Expert Report and Proposed Testimony of Convolve Expert Bruce McFarlane)(Anderson, A)
June 7, 2011 Filing 350 SEALED RESPONSE and Memorandum of Law by Plaintiff Convolve, Inc. in Opposition to Motion re #324 SEALED MOTION Dell's Motion for Summary Judgment on Convolve's Claim of Willful Infringement for US Patent No. 6,314,473 filed by Convolve, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Bryan J. Vogel in Support of Convolve's Response and Memorandum of Law in Opposition, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24, #26 Exhibit 25, #27 Exhibit 26, #28 Exhibit 27, #29 Exhibit 28, #30 Exhibit 29, #31 Exhibit 30, #32 Exhibit 31, #33 Exhibit 32, #34 Exhibit 33, #35 Exhibit 34, #36 Exhibit 35, #37 Exhibit 36, #38 Exhibit 37, #39 Exhibit 38, #40 Exhibit 39, #41 Exhibit 40, #42 Exhibit 41, #43 Exhibit 42, #44 Exhibit 43, #45 Exhibit 44, #46 Exhibit 45, #47 Exhibit 46, #48 Exhibit 47, #49 Exhibit 48, #50 Exhibit 49, #51 Text of Proposed Order)(Vogel, Bryan)
June 7, 2011 Filing 349 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #323 SEALED MOTION DAUBERT MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE EXPERT TESTIMONY AND STRIKE THE EXPERT REPORTS OF DANIEL J. SLOTTJE AND KEITH R. UGONE filed by Western Digital Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Wessel, Bruce)
June 7, 2011 Filing 348 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #333 Joint SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment that the Asserted Claims of the '473 Patent are Invalid filed by Convolve, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Response in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment that Asserted Claims of the '473 Patent are Invalid, #2 Exhibit 2 Response in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment that Asserted Claims of the '473 Patent are Invalid, #3 Exhibit 3 Response in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment that Asserted Claims of the '473 Patent are Invalid, #4 Exhibit 4 Response in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment that Asserted Claims of the '473 Patent are Invalid, #5 Exhibit 5 Response in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment that Asserted Claims of the '473 Patent are Invalid, #6 Exhibit 6 Response in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment that Asserted Claims of the '473 Patent are Invalid, #7 Exhibit 7 Response in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment that Asserted Claims of the '473 Patent are Invalid, #8 Exhibit 8 Response in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment that Asserted Claims of the '473 Patent are Invalid, #9 Exhibit 9 Response in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment that Asserted Claims of the '473 Patent are Invalid, #10 Exhibit 10 Response in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment that Asserted Claims of the '473 Patent are Invalid, #11 Exhibit 11 Response in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment that Asserted Claims of the '473 Patent are Invalid, #12 Exhibit 12 Response in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment that Asserted Claims of the '473 Patent are Invalid, #13 Exhibit 13 Response in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment that Asserted Claims of the '473 Patent are Invalid, #14 Exhibit 14 Response in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment that Asserted Claims of the '473 Patent are Invalid, #15 Text of Proposed Order for Response in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment that Asserted Claims of the '473 Patent are Invalid)(Anderson, A)
June 7, 2011 Filing 347 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #330 SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Damages filed by Convolve, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Response in Opposition to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Damages, #2 Exhibit 2 to Response in Opposition to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Damages, #3 Exhibit 3 to Response in Opposition to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Damages, #4 Exhibit 4 to Response in Opposition to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Damages, #5 Exhibit 5 to Response in Opposition to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Damages, #6 Exhibit 6 to Response in Opposition to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Damages, #7 Exhibit 7 to Response in Opposition to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Damages, #8 Exhibit 8 to Response in Opposition to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Damages, #9 Exhibit 9 to Response in Opposition to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Damages, #10 Exhibit 10 to Response in Opposition to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Damages, #11 Exhibit 11 to Response in Opposition to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Damages, #12 Exhibit 12 to Response in Opposition to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Damages, #13 Exhibit 13 to Response in Opposition to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Damages, #14 Exhibit 14 to Response in Opposition to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Damages, #15 Text of Proposed Order to Response in Opposition to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Damages)(Anderson, A)
June 7, 2011 Filing 346 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #323 SEALED MOTION DAUBERT MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE EXPERT TESTIMONY AND STRIKE THE EXPERT REPORTS OF DANIEL J. SLOTTJE AND KEITH R. UGONE filed by Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc., Hitachi Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Homrig, Jeffrey)
June 7, 2011 Filing 345 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #326 SEALED MOTION PLAINTIFF CONVOLVE, INC.S MOTION TO EXCLUDE OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO STRIKE THE EXPERT TESTIMONY AND EXPERT REPORT OF DR. JOHN LEVY filed by Dell Inc., Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc., Hitachi Ltd., Western Digital Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(Wessel, Bruce)
June 7, 2011 Filing 344 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #327 SEALED MOTION PLAINTIFF CONVOLVE, INC.S DAUBERT MOTION TO EXCLUDE THAT PORTION OF THE EXPERT REPORT AND TESTIMONY OF W. CHRISTOPHER BAKEWELL WHICH RELIES ON THE WHITE LICENSES filed by Dell Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Fulghum, Roger)
June 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 343 ORDER REGARDING EXHIBITS - The Court enters this order sua sponte. Due to the voluminous exhibits expected to be tendered during the trial of this case, the Court ORDERS the following: (see order). Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/7/2011. (ch, )
June 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 342 ORDER granting #340 Joint Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order. Docket Control Order is Amended as follows herein. Proposed Joint Final Pretial Order 6/16/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/7/2011. (ch, )
June 6, 2011 Filing 341 SEALED REPLY; re #295 PLAINTIFF CONVOLVE, INC.'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF DR. A. BRUCE BUCKMAN'S AND DR. MICHAEL D. SIDMAN'S EXPERT REPORTS ON INVALIDITY OF THE '473 PATENT re #295 Opposed SEALED MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF DR. BUCKMAN'S AND DR. SIDMAN'S EXPERT REPORTS ON INVALIDITY OF THE '473 PATENT filed by Convolve, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Albritton, Eric)
June 6, 2011 Filing 340 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #253 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings, Terminate Motions,,,,,, by Western Digital Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wessel, Bruce)
June 2, 2011 Filing 339 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #308 SEALED MOTION , Defendants' Motion for Spoliation Sanctions Arising Out of Convolve's Destruction of Documents, filed by Convolve, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Response to Motion for Spoliation Sanctions, #2 Exhibit B to Response to Motion for Spoliation Sanctions, #3 Exhibit C to Response to Motion for Spoliation Sanctions, #4 Exhibit D to Response to Motion for Spoliation Sanctions, #5 Exhibit E to Response to Motion for Spoliation Sanctions, #6 Exhibit F to Response to Motion for Spoliation Sanctions, #7 Exhibit G to Response to Motion for Spoliation Sanctions, #8 Text of Proposed Order to Response to Motion for Spoliation Sanctions)(Anderson, A)
May 31, 2011 Filing 338 MOTION to Strike and Exclude the Expert Testimony and Expert Report of Seth T. Kaplan, Ph.D. by Convolve, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Convolve's Motion to Exclude Kaplan, #2 Exhibit 2 to Convolve's Motion to Exclude Kaplan, #3 Exhibit 3 to Convolve's Motion to Exclude Kaplan, #4 Exhibit 4 to Convolve's Motion to Exclude Kaplan, #5 Exhibit 5 to Convolve's Motion to Exclude Kaplan, #6 Exhibit 6 to Convolve's Motion to Exclude Kaplan, #7 Exhibit 7 to Convolve's Motion to Exclude Kaplan, #8 Text of Proposed Order to Convolve's Motion to Exclude Kaplan)(Anderson, A)
May 31, 2011 ***FILED IN ERROR, PER ATTY, ATTY HAS REFILED (SEE #332). Document # 331, Sealed Motion for Sum Jgm, terminated. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (sm, )
May 31, 2011 ***FILED IN ERROR, PER ATTY, ATTY HAS REFILED (SEE #336). Document # 335, Sealed Motion for sum jgm is now terminated. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (sm, )
May 27, 2011 Filing 337 SEALED MOTION Hitachi Ltd. and Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement by Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc., Hitachi Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Text of Proposed Order)(Homrig, Jeffrey)
May 27, 2011 Filing 336 SEALED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT (CORRECTED) by Western Digital Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Text of Proposed Order)(Birnholz, Richard)
May 27, 2011 Filing 335 ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE.***SEALED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT by Western Digital Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Text of Proposed Order)(Birnholz, Richard) Modified on 5/31/2011 (sm, ).
May 27, 2011 Filing 334 SEALED MOTION To Exclude Survey And Expert Report Of Dr. Kent Van Liere For Failure To Comply With Federal Rules Of Evidence 702 And 403 by Dell Inc., Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc., Hitachi Ltd., Western Digital Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Affidavit Declaration of Anna Greenberg, #19 Affidavit Declaration of Bradley Bowling, #20 Text of Proposed Order)(Wessel, Bruce)
May 27, 2011 Filing 333 Joint SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment that the Asserted Claims of the '473 Patent are Invalid by Dell Inc., Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc., Hitachi Ltd., Western Digital Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Text of Proposed Order)(Homrig, Jeffrey)
May 27, 2011 Filing 332 SEALED MOTION CORRECTED MOTION - Dell Inc's Motion for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement of Claims 7 and 10 of US Patent 6,314,473 by Dell Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Tammy Pennington Rhodes, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Fulghum, Roger)
May 27, 2011 Filing 331 ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE.***SEALED MOTION Dell Inc's Motion for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement of Claims 7 and 10 of US Patent No. 6,314,473 by Dell Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Tammy Pennington Rhodes, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Fulghum, Roger) Modified on 5/31/2011 (sm, ).
May 27, 2011 Filing 330 SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Damages by Dell Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Text of Proposed Order)(Fulghum, Roger)
May 27, 2011 Filing 329 MOTION Exclude the Expert Report of Dr. Gregory K. Leonard by Dell Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Text of Proposed Order)(Fulghum, Roger)
May 27, 2011 Filing 328 SEALED MOTION TO EXCLUDE PORTIONS OF THE EXPERT REPORT AND PROPOSED EXPERT TESTIMONY OF CONVOLVE EXPERT BRUCE MCFARLANE by Dell Inc., Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc., Hitachi Ltd., Western Digital Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Wessel, Bruce)
May 27, 2011 Filing 327 SEALED MOTION PLAINTIFF CONVOLVE, INC.S DAUBERT MOTION TO EXCLUDE THAT PORTION OF THE EXPERT REPORT AND TESTIMONY OF W. CHRISTOPHER BAKEWELL WHICH RELIES ON THE WHITE LICENSES by Convolve, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Thomas, Elizabeth)
May 27, 2011 Filing 326 SEALED MOTION PLAINTIFF CONVOLVE, INC.S MOTION TO EXCLUDE OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO STRIKE THE EXPERT TESTIMONY AND EXPERT REPORT OF DR. JOHN LEVY by Convolve, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Text of Proposed Order)(Thomas, Elizabeth)
May 27, 2011 Filing 325 SEALED MOTION , Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement of Claims 7-10, 14 and 15 of US Patent No. 6,314,473 Based on the "To The Data Storage Device" Limitation by Dell Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Tammy Pennington Rhodes, #2 Errata A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Text of Proposed Order)(Fulghum, Roger)
May 27, 2011 Filing 324 SEALED MOTION Dell's Motion for Summary Judgment on Convolve's Claim of Willful Infringement for US Patent No. 6,314,473 by Dell Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Tammy Pennington Rhodes, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(Fulghum, Roger)
May 27, 2011 Filing 323 SEALED MOTION DAUBERT MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE EXPERT TESTIMONY AND STRIKE THE EXPERT REPORTS OF DANIEL J. SLOTTJE AND KEITH R. UGONE by Convolve, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Text of Proposed Order)(Thomas, Elizabeth)
May 27, 2011 Filing 322 NOTICE of Hearing: Pretrial Conference RESET for 6/23/2011, 11:00 AM, in Mag Ctrm (Marshall) before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham. (delat, )
May 26, 2011 Filing 321 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #295 Opposed SEALED MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF DR. BUCKMAN'S AND DR. SIDMAN'S EXPERT REPORTS ON INVALIDITY OF THE '473 PATENT filed by Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc., Hitachi Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit Exhibit O)(Homrig, Jeffrey)
May 26, 2011 Filing 320 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re #272 Opposed SEALED MOTION Plaintiff Convolve, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Defendant Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc. and Hitachi LTD to Supplement its Interrogatory Responses and Produce Deposition Witnesses filed by Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc., Hitachi Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 45, #2 Exhibit 46)(Homrig, Jeffrey)
May 26, 2011 Filing 319 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #295 Opposed SEALED MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF DR. BUCKMAN'S AND DR. SIDMAN'S EXPERT REPORTS ON INVALIDITY OF THE '473 PATENT filed by Western Digital Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Text of Proposed Order)(Wessel, Bruce) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/27/2011: #12 REVISED ORDER REMOVING PROPOSED) (ch, ).
May 26, 2011 Filing 318 RESPONSE in Opposition re #295 Opposed SEALED MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF DR. BUCKMAN'S AND DR. SIDMAN'S EXPERT REPORTS ON INVALIDITY OF THE '473 PATENT filed by Dell Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Fulghum, Roger)
May 23, 2011 Filing 317 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #305 Emergency SEALED MOTION to Compel Disclosure filed by Dell Inc., Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc., Hitachi Ltd., Western Digital Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit M, #2 Exhibit N, #3 Exhibit O, #4 Exhibit P, #5 Exhibit Q, #6 Exhibit R, #7 Exhibit S)(Wessel, Bruce)
May 23, 2011 Filing 316 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #305 Emergency SEALED MOTION to Compel Disclosure filed by Convolve, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Convolve's Response to Defendants' Emergency Motion to Compel, #2 Exhibit B to Convolve's Response to Defendants' Emergency Motion to Compel, #3 Exhibit C to Convolve's Response to Defendants' Emergency Motion to Compel, #4 Exhibit D to Convolve's Response to Defendants' Emergency Motion to Compel, #5 Exhibit E to Convolve's Response to Defendants' Emergency Motion to Compel, #6 Exhibit F to Convolve's Response to Defendants' Emergency Motion to Compel, #7 Exhibit G to Convolve's Response to Defendants' Emergency Motion to Compel, #8 Exhibit H to Convolve's Response to Defendants' Emergency Motion to Compel, #9 Exhibit I to Convolve's Response to Defendants' Emergency Motion to Compel, #10 Exhibit J to Convolve's Response to Defendants' Emergency Motion to Compel, #11 Exhibit K to Convolve's Response to Defendants' Emergency Motion to Compel, #12 Exhibit L to Convolve's Response to Defendants' Emergency Motion to Compel, #13 Exhibit M to Convolve's Response to Defendants' Emergency Motion to Compel, #14 Text of Proposed Order to Convolve's Response to Defendants' Emergency Motion to Compel)(Anderson, A)
May 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 315 ORDER granting motion to amend deadlines. Discovery due by 5/20/2011., Motions due by 5/27/2011.), Motions terminated: #314 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #253 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings, Terminate Motions,,,,,, filed by Convolve, Inc... Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 5/23/11. (ehs, )
May 23, 2011 ***FILED IN ERROR, WRONG EVENT USED, ATTY MUST REFILE USING THE CORRECT EVENT, THIS MOTION IS NOW TERMINATED. Document # 313, Sealed Motion to emergency motion. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (sm, )
May 20, 2011 Filing 314 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #253 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings, Terminate Motions,,,,,, by Convolve, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Halsey, Anna)
May 20, 2011 Filing 313 ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE.***SEALED MOTION of Plaintiff Convolve, Inc.'s Response and Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendants' Emergency Motion to Compel Disclosure (Docket No. 305) by Convolve, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Convolve's Response to Defendants' Emergency Motion to Compel, #2 Exhibit B to Convolve's Response to Defendants' Emergency Motion to Compel, #3 Exhibit C to Convolve's Response to Defendants' Emergency Motion to Compel, #4 Exhibit D to Convolve's Response to Defendants' Emergency Motion to Compel, #5 Exhibit E to Convolve's Response to Defendants' Emergency Motion to Compel, #6 Exhibit F to Convolve's Response to Defendants' Emergency Motion to Compel, #7 Exhibit G to Convolve's Response to Defendants' Emergency Motion to Compel, #8 Exhibit H to Convolve's Response to Defendants' Emergency Motion to Compel, #9 Exhibit I to Convolve's Response to Defendants' Emergency Motion to Compel, #10 Exhibit J to Convolve's Response to Defendants' Emergency Motion to Compel, #11 Exhibit K to Convolve's Response to Defendants' Emergency Motion to Compel, #12 Exhibit L to Convolve's Response to Defendants' Emergency Motion to Compel, #13 Exhibit M to Convolve's Response to Defendants' Emergency Motion to Compel, #14 Text of Proposed Order to Convolve's Response to Defendants' Emergency Motion to Compel)(Anderson, A) Modified on 5/23/2011 (sm, ).
May 18, 2011 Filing 312 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Jennifer A Adler for Convolve, Inc. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-525. (ch, )
May 18, 2011 Filing 311 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Trevor John Foster for Convolve, Inc. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-525. (ch, )
May 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 310 SEALED ORDER - pending before the court is dfts Emergency Motion #305 Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 5/18/2011. (ch, ) Modified on 5/19/2011 (ch, ). Modified on 5/19/2011 (ch, ).
May 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 309 ORDER granting #307 Motion for Leave to Depose Lealon McKenzie and Randall Hampshire. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 5/17/11. (ehs, )
May 16, 2011 Filing 308 SEALED MOTION , Defendants' Motion for Spoliation Sanctions Arising Out of Convolve's Destruction of Documents, by Dell Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Tammy Pennington Rhodes, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Errata B, #4 Errata C, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Fulghum, Roger)
May 16, 2011 Filing 307 Unopposed MOTION For Leave To Depose Lealon McKenzie and Randall Hampshire Outside Of The Discovery Period by Convolve, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Anderson, A)
May 16, 2011 Filing 306 SEALED REPLY (PLAINTIFF CONVOLVE INC'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT HITACHI GLOBAL STORAGE TECHNOLOGIES, INC. AND HITACHI LTD. TO SUPPLEMENT THEIR INTERROGATORY RESPONSES AND PRODUCE DEPOSITION WITNESSES) re #272 Opposed SEALED MOTION Plaintiff Convolve, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Defendant Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc. and Hitachi LTD to Supplement its Interrogatory Responses and Produce Deposition Witnesses filed by Convolve, Inc..Attachments: #1 Exhibit 41, #2 Exhibit 42)(Albritton, Eric)
May 16, 2011 Filing 305 Emergency SEALED MOTION to Compel Disclosure by Western Digital Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Text of Proposed Order)(Wessel, Bruce)
May 12, 2011 Filing 304 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Harry Lee Gillam, Jr on behalf of Western Digital Corporation (Gillam, Harry)
May 11, 2011 Filing 303 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #271 SEALED MOTION To Compel Plaintiff Convolve, Inc. To Produce Agreements Relating To The '473 Patent And This Lawsuit And To Disclose Publicly Traded Entities With A Financial Interest In The Outcome Of This Case filed by Convolve, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Albritton, Eric)
May 10, 2011 Filing 302 NOTICE of Disclosure by Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc., Hitachi Ltd. Expert Report of Michael D. Sidman, Ph.D and Rebuttal Expert Report of Keith R. Ugone, Ph.D (Homrig, Jeffrey)
May 10, 2011 Filing 301 NOTICE by Dell Inc. Notice of Disclosure of Expert Reports (Fulghum, Roger)
May 10, 2011 Filing 300 NOTICE of Disclosure by Western Digital Corporation (Wessel, Bruce)
May 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 299 ORDER granting #296 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendant's motion to compel production. Responses due by 5/11/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 5/10/11. (ehs, )
May 9, 2011 Filing 298 NOTICE of Disclosure by Convolve, Inc. for Third Rebuttal Report of Dr. Val DiEuliis (Thomas, Elizabeth)
May 9, 2011 Filing 297 NOTICE of Disclosure by Convolve, Inc. for Second Rebuttal Expert Report of Dr. Val DiEuliis (Thomas, Elizabeth)
May 9, 2011 Filing 296 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #271 SEALED MOTION To Compel Plaintiff Convolve, Inc. To Produce Agreements Relating To The '473 Patent And This Lawsuit And To Disclose Publicly Traded Entities With A Financial Interest In The Outcome Of This Case by Convolve, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Thomas, Elizabeth)
May 6, 2011 Filing 295 Opposed SEALED MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF DR. BUCKMAN'S AND DR. SIDMAN'S EXPERT REPORTS ON INVALIDITY OF THE '473 PATENT by Convolve, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Text of Proposed Order)(Thomas, Elizabeth)
May 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 294 ORDER granting #293 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Scott F Partridge terminated, Deron Dacus be substituted as Lead Counsel.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 5/5/11. (ehs, )
May 4, 2011 Filing 293 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney , Unopposed Motion to Withdraw and Substitute Counsel and Designation of Lead Counsel, by Dell Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fulghum, Roger)
May 3, 2011 Filing 292 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #272 Opposed SEALED MOTION Plaintiff Convolve, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Defendant Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc. and Hitachi LTD to Supplement its Interrogatory Responses and Produce Deposition Witnesses filed by Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc., Hitachi Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit 37, #38 Exhibit 38, #39 Exhibit 39, #40 Exhibit 40, #41 Exhibit 41, #42 Exhibit 42, #43 Exhibit 43, #44 Exhibit 44, #45 Text of Proposed Order)(Homrig, Jeffrey)
May 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 291 ORDER granting #287 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to deft's motion to compel production. Responses due by 5/9/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 5/3/11. (ehs, )
May 3, 2011 Filing 290 REPLY to Response to Motion re #266 MOTION for Protective Order To Preclude Discovery From Non-Testifying Experts Corrected Plaintiff Reply in Support of its Motion for a Protective Order to Preclude Discovery From Convolve, Inc.'s Non-Testifying Experts filed by Convolve, Inc.. (Albritton, Eric)
May 3, 2011 ***FILED IN ERROR, WRONG EVENT USED, ATTY MUST REFILE. Document # 288, Response to Motion. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (sm, )
May 2, 2011 Filing 289 REPLY to Response to Motion re #262 Opposed MOTION Clarification of the Claim Construction Order with Respect to the Construction of Data Storage Device filed by Dell Inc.. (Dacus, Deron)
May 2, 2011 Filing 288 ****FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE.***RESPONSE to Motion re #266 MOTION for Protective Order To Preclude Discovery From Non-Testifying Experts Plaintiff's Reply in Support of its Motion for a Protective Order to To Preclude Discovery From Convolve, Inc.'s Non-Testifying Experts filed by Convolve, Inc.. (Albritton, Eric) Modified on 5/3/2011 (sm, ).
May 2, 2011 Filing 287 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendants Motion to Compel Production (Docket No. 271) by Convolve, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Albritton, Eric)
May 2, 2011 Filing 286 NOTICE of Change of Address by A James Anderson (Anderson, A)
April 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 285 ORDER granting #283 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply on Dell Inc.s Motion for Clarification of the Claim Construction Order with Respect to Data Storage Device. Responses due by 5/2/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 4/29/11. (ehs, )
April 29, 2011 Filing 284 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney David A Schwarz for Western Digital Corporation. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-488 (ch, )
April 28, 2011 Filing 283 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #262 Opposed MOTION Clarification of the Claim Construction Order with Respect to the Construction of Data Storage Device by Dell Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fulghum, Roger)
April 28, 2011 Filing 282 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher Scott Ponder on behalf of Dell Inc. (Ponder, Christopher)
April 26, 2011 Filing 281 NOTICE by Dell Inc. Defendants Dell Inc., Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc., Hitachi, Ltd and Western Digital Corporation's Compliance with Fed R. Civ. P. 26 (a) Service of "Expert Report of Dr. A. Bruce Buckman on Validity of the '473 Patent" (Fulghum, Roger)
April 26, 2011 Filing 280 NOTICE of Disclosure by Dell Inc., Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc., Hitachi Ltd., Western Digital Corporation for Expert Report of Michael D. Sidman (Homrig, Jeffrey)
April 23, 2011 Filing 279 NOTICE of Disclosure by Convolve, Inc. for the Expert Report of Dr. Val DiEuliis (Thomas, Elizabeth)
April 22, 2011 Filing 278 NOTICE of Disclosure by Convolve, Inc. for Expert Report of Bruce McFarlane (Thomas, Elizabeth)
April 22, 2011 Filing 277 NOTICE of Disclosure by Convolve, Inc. for Expert Reports of Gregory K. Leonard, PH.D. and Dr. Kent D Van Liere (Thomas, Elizabeth)
April 22, 2011 Filing 276 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #275 Sealed Response to Motion,, Proposed Order. (Wessel, Bruce)
April 22, 2011 Filing 275 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #266 MOTION for Protective Order To Preclude Discovery From Non-Testifying Experts filed by Western Digital Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V, #23 Exhibit W, #24 Exhibit X, #25 Exhibit Y)(Wessel, Bruce)
April 19, 2011 Filing 274 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Patricia Young on behalf of Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc., Hitachi Ltd. (Young, Patricia)
April 18, 2011 Filing 273 RESPONSE in Opposition re #262 Opposed MOTION Clarification of the Claim Construction Order with Respect to the Construction of Data Storage Device Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant Dell Inc.'s Motion for Clarification of the Claim Construction Order with Respect to the Construction of Data Storage Device filed by Convolve, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Marla Butler, #2 Exhibit 1)(Albritton, Eric)
April 15, 2011 Filing 272 Opposed SEALED MOTION Plaintiff Convolve, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Defendant Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc. and Hitachi LTD to Supplement its Interrogatory Responses and Produce Deposition Witnesses by Convolve, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33-A, #34 Exhibit 33, #35 Exhibit 34, #36 Exhibit 35, #37 Exhibit 36, #38 Exhibit 37, #39 Exhibit 38, #40 Exhibit 39, #41 Exhibit 40, #42 Text of Proposed Order)(Albritton, Eric)
April 15, 2011 Filing 271 SEALED MOTION To Compel Plaintiff Convolve, Inc. To Produce Agreements Relating To The '473 Patent And This Lawsuit And To Disclose Publicly Traded Entities With A Financial Interest In The Outcome Of This Case by Dell Inc., Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc., Hitachi Ltd., Western Digital Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(Werner, Thomas)
April 12, 2011 Filing 270 NOTICE of Disclosure by Western Digital Corporation of Second Amended Initial Disclosures (Wessel, Bruce)
April 7, 2011 Filing 269 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #243 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Amend Contentions Defendant Dell Inc's Sur-Reply to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Supplement Its Local Patent Rule 3-1 and 3-2 Disclosures, filed by Dell Inc.. (Fulghum, Roger)
April 5, 2011 Filing 268 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #243 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Amend Contentions filed by Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc., Hitachi Ltd.. (Homrig, Jeffrey)
April 5, 2011 Filing 267 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kimball R Anderson on behalf of Dell Inc. (Anderson, Kimball)
April 5, 2011 Filing 266 MOTION for Protective Order To Preclude Discovery From Non-Testifying Experts by Convolve, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V, #23 Exhibit W, #24 Exhibit X, #25 Exhibit Y, #26 Text of Proposed Order PROPOSED ORDER)(Thomas, Elizabeth) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/5/2011: #27 REVISED ORDER (REMOVED PROPOSED)) (ch, ).
April 1, 2011 Filing 265 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Marcus T Hall for Dell Inc.,Marcus T Hall for Dell Inc.. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-418) (ehs, )
March 31, 2011 ***FILED IN ERROR, WRONG EVENT USED, THE DOCUMENT (PROPOSED ORDER) HAS BEEN ATTACHED TO #262 MOTION, THIS ENTRY (#264) IS NOW TERMINATED. Document # 264, Opposed Motion Clarification. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (sm, )
March 30, 2011 Filing 264 ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE.***Opposed MOTION Clarification re #262 Opposed MOTION Clarification of the Claim Construction Order with Respect to the Construction of Data Storage Device [PROPOSED ORDER] by Dell Inc.. (Pennington, Tammy) Modified on 3/31/2011 (sm, ).
March 30, 2011 Filing 263 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Amanda Woodall on behalf of Dell Inc. (Woodall, Amanda)
March 30, 2011 Filing 262 Opposed MOTION Clarification of the Claim Construction Order with Respect to the Construction of Data Storage Device by Dell Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Tammy Pennington Rhodes, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(Fulghum, Roger) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/31/2011: #7 Text of Proposed Order) (sm, ).
March 25, 2011 Filing 261 REPLY to Response to Motion re #243 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Amend Contentions Reply in to Dell's Response filed by Convolve, Inc.. (Thomas, Elizabeth)
March 25, 2011 Filing 260 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #243 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Amend Contentions filed by Convolve, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 10)(Thomas, Elizabeth)
March 23, 2011 Filing 259 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Garland A Kelley for Western Digital Corporation. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-396 (ch, )
March 21, 2011 Filing 258 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #226 SEALED MOTION For Leave to File Its Second Amended Complaint filed by Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc., Hitachi Ltd., Western Digital Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Lee, Joseph)
March 15, 2011 ***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY Document # 256, Affidavit in Opposition. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ATTORNEY REFILED SEE # 257)(ch, )
March 14, 2011 Filing 257 RESPONSE in Opposition re #243 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Amend Contentions filed by Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc., Hitachi Ltd., Western Digital Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Lee, Joseph)
March 14, 2011 Filing 256 ***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY. PLEASE IGNORE.*** AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re #243 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Amend Contentions filed by Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc., Hitachi Ltd., Western Digital Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Lee, Joseph) Modified on 3/15/2011 (ch, ).
March 14, 2011 Filing 255 RESPONSE in Opposition re #243 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Amend Contentions filed by Dell Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fulghum, Roger)
March 11, 2011 Filing 254 REPLY to Response to Motion re #226 SEALED MOTION For Leave to File Its Second Amended Complaint as to Defendants Hitachi and Western Digital (Docket No. 248) filed by Convolve, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 7 to Convolve's Reply in Support of Its Motion for Leave to File its Second Amended Complaint as to Defendants Hitachi and Western Digital (Docket No. 248), #2 Exhibit 8 to Convolve's Reply in Support of Its Motion for Leave to File its Second Amended Complaint as to Defendants Hitachi and Western Digital (Docket No. 248))(Anderson, A)
March 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 253 AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER, ( Discovery due by 4/15/2011., Expert Witness List due by 4/22/2011., Motions due by 6/7/2011., Proposed Pretrial Order due by 6/15/2011., Jury Selection set for 7/5/2011 09:00AM before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham., Pretrial Conference set for 6/27/2011 01:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham.), Motions terminated: #251 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct The Docket Control Order filed by Convolve, Inc... Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 3/11/11. (ehs, )
March 10, 2011 Filing 252 REPLY to Response to Motion re #226 SEALED MOTION For Leave to File Its Second Amended Complaint as to Defendant Dell Inc. (Docket No. 247) filed by Convolve, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 7 to Convolve, Inc.'s Reply in Support of its Motion for Leave to File its Second Amended Complaint as to Defendant Dell Inc. Docket No. 247, #2 Exhibit 8 to Convolve, Inc.'s Reply in Support of its Motion for Leave to File its Second Amended Complaint as to Defendant Dell Inc. Docket No. 247)(Anderson, A)
March 10, 2011 Filing 251 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct The Docket Control Order by Convolve, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order for Joint Motion to Amend the Docket Control Order)(Anderson, A)
March 10, 2011 Filing 250 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeremy Jason Lang on behalf of Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc., Hitachi Ltd. (Lang, Jeremy)
March 9, 2011 Filing 249 NOTICE by Western Digital Corporation of Action in Related Action (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Smith, Melissa)
February 28, 2011 Filing 248 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #226 SEALED MOTION For Leave to File Its Second Amended Complaint filed by Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc., Hitachi Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Jeffrey G. Homrig, #3 Affidavit Declaration of Thomas C. Werner)(Lee, Joseph)
February 28, 2011 Filing 247 RESPONSE in Opposition re #226 SEALED MOTION For Leave to File Its Second Amended Complaint filed by Dell Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fulghum, Roger)
February 28, 2011 Filing 246 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Deron R Dacus on behalf of Dell Inc. (Dacus, Deron)
February 25, 2011 Filing 245 NOTICE by Dell Inc. of Service of Defendants' Final Invalidity Contentions Pursuant to PR 3-6(a)(2) (Fulghum, Roger)
February 25, 2011 Filing 244 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joseph H Lee on behalf of Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc., Hitachi Ltd. (Lee, Joseph)
February 24, 2011 Filing 243 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Amend Contentions by Convolve, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2, #2 Exhibit 3, #3 Exhibit 4, #4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 1)(Thomas, Elizabeth)
February 24, 2011 Filing 242 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melissa Richards Smith on behalf of Western Digital Corporation (Smith, Melissa)
February 24, 2011 Filing 241 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Richard M Birnholz for Western Digital Corporation. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-326) (ehs, )
February 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 240 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #140 Motion to Compel. Plaintiff is ordered to produce information from the New York litigation not restricted by that courts protective order. With respect to information covered by the New York courts protective order, Plaintiff is ordered to seek a waiver from the party who initially produced the protected discovery for production in this matter under this courts protective order within one week of this order. Should the corresponding New York party not cooperate, Plaintiff is ordered to disclose the partys name, and generally describe the nature of the information produced within three weeks of this order.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 2/23/11. (ehs, )
February 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 239 ORDER granting #234 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Sudip Kundu; Patricia E Chow and Jason D Kipnis terminated as counsel for Hitachi Global Storage Technologies Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 2/22/2011. (ch, )
February 21, 2011 Filing 238 NOTICE of Disclosure by Convolve, Inc. Rebuttal Expert Report of Dr. Val DiEuliis (Thomas, Elizabeth)
February 18, 2011 Filing 237 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re #220 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Convolve's Opposed Motion To Extend The Deadline For Fact Discovery And To Clarify The Scope Thereof, #219 Opposed MOTION to Continue Partially Opposed Motion to Continue the Trial Date and To Amend the Docket Control Order, #218 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Partially Opposed Motion to Extend the Deadline For Disclosure of Expert Testimony And Certain Other Pending Deadlines Further Declaration of Thomas C. Werner filed by Western Digital Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C)(Wessel, Bruce)
February 18, 2011 Filing 236 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #220 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Convolve's Opposed Motion To Extend The Deadline For Fact Discovery And To Clarify The Scope Thereof, #219 Opposed MOTION to Continue Partially Opposed Motion to Continue the Trial Date and To Amend the Docket Control Order, #218 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Partially Opposed Motion to Extend the Deadline For Disclosure of Expert Testimony And Certain Other Pending Deadlines filed by Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc., Hitachi Ltd., Western Digital Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 4, #2 Exhibit 5, #3 Exhibit 6, #4 Exhibit 7, #5 Exhibit 8, #6 Exhibit 9, #7 Exhibit 10, #8 Exhibit 11)(Wessel, Bruce)
February 18, 2011 Filing 235 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #220 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Convolve's Opposed Motion To Extend The Deadline For Fact Discovery And To Clarify The Scope Thereof, #219 Opposed MOTION to Continue Partially Opposed Motion to Continue the Trial Date and To Amend the Docket Control Order, #218 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Partially Opposed Motion to Extend the Deadline For Disclosure of Expert Testimony And Certain Other Pending Deadlines filed by Dell Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Tammy Pennington Rhodes, #2 Exhibit Exhibit I, #3 Exhibit Exhibit J, #4 Exhibit Exhibit K, #5 Exhibit Exhibit L, #6 Exhibit Exhibit M, #7 Exhibit Exhibit N, #8 Exhibit Exhibit O)(Fulghum, Roger)
February 18, 2011 Filing 234 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Unopposed Motion to Withdraw Current and Former Attorneys of the law firm Weil Gotshal & Manges by Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Homrig, Jeffrey)
February 14, 2011 Filing 233 REPLY to Response to Motion re #220 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Convolve's Opposed Motion To Extend The Deadline For Fact Discovery And To Clarify The Scope Thereof Plaintiff's Reply in Support of its Motion to Extend the Deadline for Fact Discovery and to Clarify the Scope thereof (Docket No. 220) as to Defendants Western Digital and Hitachi (Docket No. 228) filed by Convolve, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Errata G)(Albritton, Eric)
February 14, 2011 Filing 232 REPLY to Response to Motion re #220 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Convolve's Opposed Motion To Extend The Deadline For Fact Discovery And To Clarify The Scope Thereof, #219 Opposed MOTION to Continue Partially Opposed Motion to Continue the Trial Date and To Amend the Docket Control Order, #218 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Partially Opposed Motion to Extend the Deadline For Disclosure of Expert Testimony And Certain Other Pending Deadlines Plaintiff's Combined Reply in Support of its Motions to Extend the Deadline for Disclosure of Expert Testimony on Issues for which a party bears the burden of proof and certain other deadlines (#218), continue the trial date and to amend the docket control order (#219), and to extend the deadline for fact discovery and to clarify the scope thereof (#220) (collectively docket # 218, 219 and 220) as to Defendant Dell Inc. (Docket No. 227) filed by Convolve, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit L)(Albritton, Eric)
February 11, 2011 Filing 231 Additional Attachments to Main Document (Certificate of Service): #230 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion,, #229 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion,, #228 Response in Opposition to Motion,,.. (Werner, Thomas) Modified on 2/11/2011 (sm, ).
February 10, 2011 Filing 230 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re #220 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Convolve's Opposed Motion To Extend The Deadline For Fact Discovery And To Clarify The Scope Thereof, #219 Opposed MOTION to Continue Partially Opposed Motion to Continue the Trial Date and To Amend the Docket Control Order, #218 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Partially Opposed Motion to Extend the Deadline For Disclosure of Expert Testimony And Certain Other Pending Deadlines Declaration of Jeffrey Homrig filed by Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc., Hitachi Ltd.. (Wessel, Bruce)
February 10, 2011 Filing 229 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re #220 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Convolve's Opposed Motion To Extend The Deadline For Fact Discovery And To Clarify The Scope Thereof, #219 Opposed MOTION to Continue Partially Opposed Motion to Continue the Trial Date and To Amend the Docket Control Order, #218 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Partially Opposed Motion to Extend the Deadline For Disclosure of Expert Testimony And Certain Other Pending Deadlines Declaration of Thomas C. Werner filed by Western Digital Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Wessel, Bruce)
February 10, 2011 Filing 228 RESPONSE in Opposition re #220 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Convolve's Opposed Motion To Extend The Deadline For Fact Discovery And To Clarify The Scope Thereof, #219 Opposed MOTION to Continue Partially Opposed Motion to Continue the Trial Date and To Amend the Docket Control Order, #218 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Partially Opposed Motion to Extend the Deadline For Disclosure of Expert Testimony And Certain Other Pending Deadlines filed by Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc., Hitachi Ltd., Western Digital Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Wessel, Bruce)
February 10, 2011 Filing 227 RESPONSE to Motion re #220 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Convolve's Opposed Motion To Extend The Deadline For Fact Discovery And To Clarify The Scope Thereof, #219 Opposed MOTION to Continue Partially Opposed Motion to Continue the Trial Date and To Amend the Docket Control Order, #218 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Partially Opposed Motion to Extend the Deadline For Disclosure of Expert Testimony And Certain Other Pending Deadlines filed by Dell Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Tammy Pennington Rhodes, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Text of Proposed Order Re: Docket No. 218, #11 Text of Proposed Order Re: Docket No. 219, #12 Text of Proposed Order Re: Docket No. 220)(Fulghum, Roger)
February 8, 2011 Filing 226 SEALED MOTION For Leave to File Its Second Amended Complaint by Convolve, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Convolve Second Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit A to Convolve's Second Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit B to Convolve's Second Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit C to Convolve's Second Amended Complaint, #5 Exhibit D to Convolve's Second Amended Complaint, #6 Exhibit E to Convolve's Second Amended Complaint, #7 Exhibit F to Convolve's Second Amended Complaint, #8 Exhibit G to Convolve's Second Amended Complaint, #9 Exhibit H to Convolve's Second Amended Complaint, #10 Exhibit I to Convolve's Second Amended Complaint, #11 Exhibit J to Convolve's Second Amended Complaint, #12 Exhibit K to Convolve's Second Amended Complaint, #13 Exhibit L to Convolve's Second Amended Complaint, #14 Exhibit M to Convolve's Second Amended Complaint, #15 Exhibit N to Convolve's Second Amended Complaint, #16 Exhibit O to Convolve's Second Amended Complaint, #17 Exhibit P to Convolve's Second Amended Complaint, #18 Exhibit Q to Convolve's Second Amended Complaint, #19 Exhibit R to Convolve's Second Amended Complaint, #20 Exhibit S to Convolve's Second Amended Complaint, #21 Exhibit T to Convolve's Second Amended Complaint, #22 Exhibit 2 to Motion for Leave to File Its Second Amended Complaint, #23 Exhibit 3 to Motion for Leave to File Its Second Amended Complaint, #24 Exhibit 4 to Motion for Leave to File Its Second Amended Complaint, #25 Exhibit 5 to Motion for Leave to File Its Second Amended Complaint, #26 Exhibit 6 to Motion for Leave to File Its Second Amended Complaint, #27 Text of Proposed Order to Motion for Leave to File Its Second Amended Complaint)(Thomas, Elizabeth) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/9/2011: #28 REVISED ORDER (REMOVING THE PROPOSED)) (ch, ).
February 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 225 ORDER granting #223 Motion for Extension of Deadlines for Disclosure of Rebuttal Expert Testimony in Response to Dell's Expert Disclosures. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 2/7/2011. (ch, )
February 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 224 ORDER - granting #222 Joint Motion to Expedite Briefing on Certain Pending Motions #218 Motion for Extension of Time to File; granting #219 Motion to Continue; granting #220 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. (See order for deadlines) Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 2-5-2011. (delat, ) Modified on 2/10/2011 (ch, ).
February 3, 2011 Filing 223 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Convolve, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion to Extend the Deadline for Disclosure of Rebuttal Expert Testimony in Response to Dell's Expert Disclosure (Step 33 of the Docket Control Order) by Convolve, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Albritton, Eric)
February 3, 2011 Filing 222 Joint MOTION to Expedite Joint Motion to Expedite Briefing on Certain Pending Motions (Docket # 218, 219 and 220) by Convolve, Inc., Dell Inc., Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc., Hitachi Ltd., Western Digital Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Albritton, Eric)
February 2, 2011 Filing 221 NOTICE of Disclosure by Dell Inc. of Defendant Dell Inc's Expert Testimony on Issues for Which Defendant Bears the Burden of Proof, (Fulghum, Roger)
February 2, 2011 Filing 220 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Convolve's Opposed Motion To Extend The Deadline For Fact Discovery And To Clarify The Scope Thereof by Convolve, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Convolve's Opposed Motion To Extend The Deadline For Fact Discovery And To Clarify The Scope Thereof, #13 Text of Proposed Order Alternative Proposed Order Granting Convolve's Opposed Motion To Extend The Deadline For Fact Discovery And To Clarify The Scope Thereof)(Thomas, Elizabeth)
February 1, 2011 Filing 219 Opposed MOTION to Continue Partially Opposed Motion to Continue the Trial Date and To Amend the Docket Control Order by Convolve, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order re Motion to Continue the Trial Date and To Amend the Docket Control Order)(Thomas, Elizabeth)
February 1, 2011 Filing 218 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Partially Opposed Motion to Extend the Deadline For Disclosure of Expert Testimony And Certain Other Pending Deadlines by Convolve, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion to Extend the Deadline For Disclosure of Expert Testimony And Certain Other Pending Deadlines)(Thomas, Elizabeth)
January 21, 2011 Filing 217 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #200 Opposed SEALED MOTION and Memorandum of Law for Leave to Supplement Its Local Patent Rule 3-1 Disclosures to Dell Inc. to Include Dell Computers Incorporating Seagate Hard Disk Drives filed by Dell Inc.. (Fulghum, Roger)
January 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 216 ORDER granting #215 Motion for Extension of Time to extend deadline for disclosure. Deadline is 2/1/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 1/19/2011. (ch, )
January 18, 2011 Filing 215 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend #131 Order Joint Motion to Extend the Deadline for Disclosures of Expert Testimony on Issues for which a party bears the burden of proof (Step 32 of the Docket Control Order) by Convolve, Inc., Dell Inc., Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc., Hitachi Ltd., Western Digital Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Albritton, Eric)
January 10, 2011 Filing 214 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of "HOTLINE" HEARING RE DISCOVERY held on 12/3/10 before Judge John D. Love. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Exceptional Reporting Services, Inc.,Telephone number: (361) 949-2988. (12 Pages)NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/3/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/14/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/14/2011. (tja, )
January 7, 2011 Filing 213 SEALED Plaintiff's Convolve, Inc.'s Reply in Support of its Motion for Leave to Supplement its Local Patent Rule 3-1 Disclosures to Dell Inc. to Include Dell Computers incorpating Seagate Hard Disk Drives...SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #200 Opposed SEALED MOTION and Memorandum of Law for Leave to Supplement Its Local Patent Rule 3-1 Disclosures to Dell Inc. to Include Dell Computers Incorporating Seagate Hard Disk Drives filed by Convolve, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit W, #2 Exhibit X, #3 Exhibit Y, #4 Exhibit Z, #5 Exhibit AA) (Albritton, Eric)
January 7, 2011 Filing 212 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stephen E Edwards on behalf of Convolve, Inc. (Edwards, Stephen)
January 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 211 MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER - court issues the following order concerning the claim construction issues. The court adopts the constructions set forth in this opinion for the disputed terms of the 473 patent. The parties are ordered that they may not refer, directly or indirectly, to each others claim construction positions in the presence of the jury. Likewise, the parties are ordered to refrain from mentioning any portion of this opinion, other than the actual definitions adopted by the court, in the presence of the jury. Any reference to claim construction proceedings is limited to informing the jury of the definitions adopted by the court.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 1/5/11. (ehs, )
January 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 210 ORDER granting #209 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply in Support of its Motion for Leave to Supplement Its Local Patent Rule 3-1 Disclosure to Dell Inc. To Include Dell Computers Incorporating Seagate Hard Disk Drives (Docket No. 200). Deadline extended to 1/7/11. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 1/4/11. (ehs, )
January 3, 2011 Filing 209 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Reply in Support of its Motion for Leave to Supplement its PR 3-1 Disclosures to Include Dell Computers Incorporating Seagate Hard Disk Drive by Convolve, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Albritton, Eric)
December 23, 2010 Filing 208 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #200 Opposed SEALED MOTION and Memorandum of Law for Leave to Supplement Its Local Patent Rule 3-1 Disclosures to Dell Inc. to Include Dell Computers Incorporating Seagate Hard Disk Drives filed by Dell Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Tammy Pennington Rhodes, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit G.1, #11 Exhibit H, #12 Exhibit I, #13 Exhibit J, #14 Exhibit K, #15 Exhibit L, #16 Exhibit M, #17 Exhibit N, #18 Exhibit O, #19 Exhibit P, #20 Exhibit Q, #21 Exhibit R, #22 Exhibit S, #23 Exhibit T, #24 Exhibit U, #25 Exhibit V, #26 Exhibit W, #27 Exhibit X, #28 Exhibit Y, #29 Exhibit Z)(Fulghum, Roger)
December 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 207 ORDER granting #206 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff Convolves Motion for Leave to Supplement its Local Rule 3-1 Disclosures to Dell Inc. to Include Dell Computers Incorporating Seagate Hard Disk Drives. Responses due by 12/23/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 12/9/10. (ehs, )
December 8, 2010 Filing 206 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #200 Opposed SEALED MOTION and Memorandum of Law for Leave to Supplement Its Local Patent Rule 3-1 Disclosures to Dell Inc. to Include Dell Computers Incorporating Seagate Hard Disk Drives by Dell Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fulghum, Roger)
December 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 205 HOTLINE ORDER - ruling set forth herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 12/3/10. (ehs, )
December 3, 2010 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John D. Love: Hotline Conference held on 12/3/2010. (Court Reporter M. Morris.) (mjm, )
November 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORDER granting #202 Convolve Inc.'s Motion for Leave to Supplement its Local Patent Rule 3-1 and 3-2 Disclosures to Western Digital Corporation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on November 29, 2010.(jml)
November 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 203 ORDER granting #201 Convolve, Inc.'s Motion to Partially Amend its Local Patent Rule 3-1 and 3-2 Disclosures to Defendant Dell Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on November 29, 2010. (jml)
November 24, 2010 Filing 202 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct and Memorandum of Law for Leave to Supplement Local Patent Rule 3-1 and 3-2 Disclosures to Western Digital Corporation by Convolve, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Unopposed Motion to Amend, #2 Exhibit B to Unopposed Motion to Amend, #3 Exhibit C to Unopposed Motion to Amend, #4 Exhibit D to Unopposed Motion to Amend, #5 Exhibit E to Unopposed Motion to Amend, #6 Exhibit F to Unopposed Motion to Amend, #7 Exhibit G to Unopposed Motion to Amend, #8 Text of Proposed Order to Unopposed Motion to Amend)(Anderson, A)
November 24, 2010 Filing 201 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct and Memorandum of Law for Leave to Partially Amend Its Local Patent Rule 3-1 and 3-2 Disclosures to Dell Inc. by Convolve, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Unopposed Motion to Amend, #2 Exhibit B to Unopposed Motion to Amend, #3 Exhibit C to Unopposed Motion to Amend, #4 Exhibit D to Unopposed Motion to Amend, #5 Exhibit E to Unopposed Motion to Amend, #6 Exhibit F to Unopposed Motion to Amend, #7 Exhibit G to Unopposed Motion to Amend, #8 Exhibit H to Unopposed Motion to Amend, #9 Text of Proposed Order to Unopposed Motion to Amend)(Anderson, A)
November 24, 2010 Filing 200 Opposed SEALED MOTION and Memorandum of Law for Leave to Supplement Its Local Patent Rule 3-1 Disclosures to Dell Inc. to Include Dell Computers Incorporating Seagate Hard Disk Drives by Convolve, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Opposed Motion to Amend, #2 Exhibit B to Opposed Motion to Amend, #3 Exhibit C to Opposed Motion to Amend, #4 Exhibit D to Opposed Motion to Amend, #5 Exhibit E to Opposed Motion to Amend, #6 Exhibit F to Opposed Motion to Amend, #7 Exhibit G to Opposed Motion to Amend, #8 Exhibit H to Opposed Motion to Amend, #9 Exhibit I to Opposed Motion to Amend, #10 Exhibit J to Opposed Motion to Amend, #11 Exhibit K to Opposed Motion to Amend, #12 Exhibit L to Opposed Motion to Amend, #13 Exhibit M to Opposed Motion to Amend, #14 Exhibit N to Opposed Motion to Amend, #15 Exhibit O to Opposed Motion to Amend, #16 Exhibit P to Opposed Motion to Amend, #17 Exhibit Q to Opposed Motion to Amend, #18 Exhibit R to Opposed Motion to Amend, #19 Exhibit S to Opposed Motion to Amend, #20 Exhibit T to Opposed Motion to Amend, #21 Exhibit U to Opposed Motion to Amend, #22 Exhibit V to Opposed Motion to Amend, #23 Text of Proposed Order to Opposed Motion to Amend)(Anderson, A)
October 29, 2010 Filing 199 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Ailis L Burpee for Convolve, Inc.. (APPROVED, FEE PAID) (ehs, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/18/2011: #1 Receipt) (poa, ).
October 29, 2010 Filing 198 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of MARKMAN HEARING held on 10/12/10 before Judge Charles Everingham. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Christy Humphries, CSR,Telephone number: (903) 533-1172. (157 Pages)NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/22/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/2/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/31/2011. (tja, )
October 15, 2010 Filing 197 NOTICE by Convolve, Inc. Plaintiff's Notice of Filing Inadvertenly Omitted Markman Exhibit (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Albritton, Eric)
October 12, 2010 Filing 196 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham: Markman Hearing held on 10/12/2010. (Court Reporter Christy Humphries, CSR.) (Attachments: #1 Attorney sign-in sheet) (jml)
October 1, 2010 Filing 195 NOTICE by Convolve, Inc. Notice of Change of Address of Counsel as to Marla R. Butler & Bryan J. Vogel (Albritton, Eric)
September 22, 2010 Filing 194 NOTICE of Hearing: Markman Hearing RESET for 10/12/2010 09:00 AM in Mag Ctrm (Marshall) before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham. (jml)
September 21, 2010 Filing 193 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joseph Shear on behalf of Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc., Hitachi Ltd. (Shear, Joseph)
September 16, 2010 Filing 192 NOTICE of Disclosure by Convolve, Inc. regarding Tech Tutorial (Albritton, Eric)
August 20, 2010 Filing 191 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #140 MOTION to Compel Defendants' Motion to Compel Production of Documents from Convolve, Inc., Plaintiffs Sur-Reply In Support if its Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Compel Production of Documents filed by Convolve, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit R, #2 Exhibit S, #3 Exhibit T)(Albritton, Eric)
August 18, 2010 Filing 190 NOTICE of Hearing: Markman Hearing RESET for 9/29/2010, 09:00 AM, in Mag Ctrm (Marshall) before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham.(delat)
August 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER granting #188 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jacqueline R Knapp terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 8/18/10. (ehs, )
August 17, 2010 Filing 188 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney JACQUELINE R. KNAPP AS COUNSEL OF RECORD by Convolve, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Albritton, Eric)
August 16, 2010 Filing 187 NOTICE of Disclosure by Convolve, Inc. Notice of Disclosure, parties submitted their Joint Claim Construction Chart, P.R. 4-5(d) to the Court in WordPerfect format (Albritton, Eric)
August 10, 2010 Filing 186 REPLY to Response to Motion re #140 MOTION to Compel Defendants' Motion to Compel Production of Documents from Convolve, Inc., filed by Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc., Hitachi Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Homrig, Jeffrey)
August 10, 2010 Filing 185 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE.***REPLY to Response to Motion re #140 MOTION to Compel Defendants' Motion to Compel Production of Documents from Convolve, Inc., filed by Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc., Hitachi Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Homrig, Jeffrey) Modified on 8/10/2010 (ch, ).
August 10, 2010 ***FILED IN ERROR. NOT IN PDF SEARCHABLE FORMAT Document # 185, Peply to Response to Motion. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
August 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ORDER granting #182 Motion for Leave to File Surreply Claim Construction Brief. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 8/2/10. (ehs, )
July 30, 2010 Filing 183 DEFENDANTS' SUR-REPLY BRIEF ON CLAIM CONSTRUCTION filed by Dell Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 28, #2 Exhibit 29, #3 Exhibit 30, #4 Exhibit 31, #5 Affidavit Supplemental Declaration of Richard Hooper PhD., P.E.)(Fulghum, Roger)
July 30, 2010 Filing 182 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Defendants' Surreply Claim Construction Brief by Dell Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fulghum, Roger)
July 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER granting #180 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply to Plaintiff onvolve, Inc's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Compel Production of ocuments from Convolve, Inc.. Responses due by 8/10/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/28/10. (ehs, )
July 27, 2010 Filing 180 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #140 MOTION to Compel Defendants' Motion to Compel Production of Documents from Convolve, Inc., by Western Digital Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wessel, Bruce)
July 26, 2010 Filing 179 Plaintiff Convolve, Inc.'s Corrected Local Patent Rule 4-5(c) Reply Claim Construction Brief - Sealed Document. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 a, #2 Exhibit 2 a, #3 Exhibit 6 a, #4 Exhibit 16, #5 Exhibit 17, #6 Exhibit 18, #7 Exhibit 19, #8 Exhibit 20, #9 Exhibit 21, #10 Exhibit 22, #11 Exhibit 23, #12 Exhibit 24, #13 Exhibit 25, #14 Exhibit 26)(Albritton, Eric)
July 26, 2010 Filing 178 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT, PLEASE IGNORE.***Plaintiff Convolve, Inc.'s Corrected Local Patent Rule 4-5(c) Claim Construction Brief - Sealed Document. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 a, #2 Exhibit 2 a, #3 Exhibit 6 a, #4 Exhibit 16, #5 Exhibit 17, #6 Exhibit 18, #7 Exhibit 19, #8 Exhibit 20, #9 Exhibit 21, #10 Exhibit 22, #11 Exhibit 23, #12 Exhibit 24, #13 Exhibit 25, #14 Exhibit 26)(Albritton, Eric) Modified on 7/26/2010 (sm, ).
July 26, 2010 NOTICE of DEFICIENCY regarding the #177 Pla Sealed Reply Brief submitted by Convolve, Inc.. No cert of authority to seal was included in document. Correction should be made by 1 business day and refiled. (sm, )
July 26, 2010 NOTICE of DEFICIENCY regarding the #178 Sealed Document - Corrected Claim Construction Brief submitted by Convolve, Inc.. No cert of authority to seal included. Atty has already made correction and refiled (See #180)(sm, )
July 23, 2010 Filing 177 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT, PLEASE IGNORE.***Plaintiff's Reply Claim Construction Brief. Sealed Document. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit)(Albritton, Eric) Modified on 7/26/2010 (sm, ).
July 16, 2010 Filing 176 Defendants' Responsive Claim Construction Brief, REPLY to #166 Claim Construction Brief, filed by Dell Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Pennington Affidavit, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24, #26 Exhibit 25, #27 Exhibit 26, #28 Exhibit 27, #29 Affidavit Declaration of Richard Hooper PhD., PE)(Fulghum, Roger)
July 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER granting #174 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply to Plaintiff Convolve, Inc's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Compel Production of Documents. Responses due by 7/27/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/14/10. (ehs, )
July 13, 2010 Filing 174 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #140 MOTION to Compel Defendants' Motion to Compel Production of Documents from Convolve, Inc., by Western Digital Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wessel, Bruce) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/13/2010: #2 REVISED ORDER) (ch, ).
July 9, 2010 Filing 173 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Bryan J Vogel for Convolve, Inc.. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-1-5471) (ehs, )
July 9, 2010 Filing 172 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Elizabeth V Thomas for Convolve, Inc.. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-1-5471) (ehs, )
July 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER granting #170 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #140 MOTION to Compel Defendants' Motion to Compel Production of Documents from Convolve, Inc., Responses due by 7/13/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/6/2010. (ch, )
July 2, 2010 Filing 170 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #140 MOTION to Compel Defendants' Motion to Compel Production of Documents from Convolve, Inc., by Western Digital Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wessel, Bruce)
July 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER granting #168 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney David C Dotson terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/2/10. (ehs, )
July 1, 2010 Filing 168 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney David C. Dotson as Counsel of Record by Convolve, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Albritton, Eric)
June 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER granting #162 Motion to Extend Certain Claim Construction Briefing Deadlines. Defendants Responsive Brief July 16, 2010. Convolves Reply Brief July 23, 2010. Defendants Reply Brief (only with leave of Court) July 30, 2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/28/10. (ehs, )
June 28, 2010 ***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY Document # 165, Claim Construction Brief. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (SEE CORRECTED DOCUMENT # 166)(ch, )
June 25, 2010 Filing 166 PLAINTIFF CONVOLVE, INC.'S CORRECTED OPENING CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Convolve, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15)(Albritton, Eric)
June 25, 2010 Filing 165 ***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY. PLEASE IGNORE.***CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Convolve, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15)(Albritton, Eric) Modified on 6/28/2010 (ch, ).
June 25, 2010 Filing 164 AMENDED LOCAL PATENT RULE 4-3 JOINT CLAIM CONSTRUCTION AND PREHEARING STATEMENT filed by Convolve, Inc. Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Albritton, Eric)
June 25, 2010 Filing 163 RESPONSE in Opposition re #140 MOTION to Compel Defendants' Motion to Compel Production of Documents from Convolve, Inc., Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Compel Production of Documents from Convolve, Inc. filed by Convolve, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q)(Albritton, Eric)
June 25, 2010 Filing 162 Unopposed MOTION by Defendants to Extend Certain Claim Construction Deadlines by Dell Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fulghum, Roger)
June 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER granting #160 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #140 MOTION to Compel Defendants' Motion to Compel Production of Documents from Convolve, Inc., Responses due by 6/25/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/15/2010. (ch, )
June 11, 2010 Filing 160 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendants' Motion to Compel Production of Documents by Convolve, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Albritton, Eric)
June 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER denying #97 Motion for Protection. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/4/2010. (ch, )
June 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER granting #157 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Dft Motion to Compel Production of Documents from Convolve. Deadline is extended to 6/11/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/3/2010. (ch, )
June 2, 2010 Filing 157 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to File a Response to Defendants' Motion to Compel Production of Documents from Convolve, Inc. by Convolve, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Albritton, Eric)
June 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER denying #133 Motion to Change Venue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/1/10. (ehs, )
June 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER denying #128 Motion for Protective Order. Because the plaintiff has not sufficiently shown a threat of competitive harm, the motion for a protective order is DENIED. The existing protective order (Dkt. No. 121) remains in effect. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/10/10. (ehs, )
May 21, 2010 Filing 154 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #133 MOTION to Change Venue Defendants' Renewed Motion to Transfer Venue Convolve, Inc.'s Sur-Reply in Support of its Opposition to Defendants Western Digital Corporation and Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc.'s Renewed Motion to Transfer filed by Convolve, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Albritton, Eric)
May 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER granting #152 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to deft's motion to compel proeduction of documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 5/21/10. (ehs, )
May 20, 2010 Filing 152 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #140 MOTION to Compel Defendants' Motion to Compel Production of Documents from Convolve, Inc., Plaintiff Convolve, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to File a Response to Defendants' Motion to Compel Production of Documents from Convolve, Inc. by Convolve, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Albritton, Eric)
May 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER granting #150 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. The parties are granted leave to file opening claim construction briefs not to exceed 45 pages per side and reply briefs not to exceed 15 pages per side. Defendants reply brief shall only be filed with leave of Court.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 5/19/10. (ehs, )
May 18, 2010 Filing 150 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Joint Motion for Expansion of Page Limits on Claim Construction Briefs, by Dell Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fulghum, Roger)
May 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER granting #148 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Convolve, Inc deadline is extended to 5/20/2010 to file a Response to Dft Motion to Compel Production of Documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 5/18/2010. (ch, )
May 17, 2010 Filing 148 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiff Convolve, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to file Response to Defendants' Motion to Compel Production of Documents from Convolve, Inc. by Convolve, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Albritton, Eric)
May 17, 2010 NOTICE FROM CLERK re #147 Claim Construction Brief. Clerk modified entry to show that it is a joint claim constrution and prehearing statement. (sm, )
May 14, 2010 Filing 147 JOINT CLAIM CONSTRUCTION and PREHEARING STATEMENT filed by Convolve, Inc., Dell Inc., Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc., Hitachi Ltd., Western Digital Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Albritton, Eric) Modified on 5/17/2010 (sm, ).
May 13, 2010 Filing 146 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey G. Homrig on behalf of Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc., Hitachi Ltd. (Homrig, Jeffrey)
May 10, 2010 Filing 145 REPLY to Response to Motion re #133 MOTION to Change Venue Defendants' Renewed Motion to Transfer Venue filed by Western Digital Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wessel, Bruce)
May 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER granting #143 Motion for Leave to Amend its Local Patent Rule 3-1 and 3-2 Disclosures. Deadline reset within three business days of the entry of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 5/6/10. (ehs, )
May 4, 2010 Filing 143 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Leave to Amend its PR 3-1 Disclosures to Defendants by Convolve, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Albritton, Eric)
April 30, 2010 Filing 142 RESPONSE to Motion re #133 MOTION to Change Venue Defendants' Renewed Motion to Transfer Venue filed by Dell Inc.. (Fulghum, Roger)
April 29, 2010 Filing 141 RESPONSE to Motion re #133 MOTION to Change Venue Defendants' Renewed Motion to Transfer Venue filed by Convolve, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L)(Albritton, Eric)
April 29, 2010 Filing 140 MOTION to Compel Defendants' Motion to Compel Production of Documents from Convolve, Inc., by Dell Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Tammy Pennington, #2 Exhibit Ex. A, #3 Exhibit Ex. B, #4 Exhibit Ex. C, #5 Exhibit Ex. D, #6 Exhibit Ex. E, #7 Exhibit Ex. F, #8 Exhibit Ex. G, #9 Exhibit Ex. H, #10 Exhibit Ex. I, #11 Exhibit Ex. J, #12 Exhibit Ex. K, #13 Exhibit Ex. L, #14 Exhibit Ex. M, #15 Text of Proposed Order)(Fulghum, Roger)
April 27, 2010 Filing 139 NOTICE of Disclosure by Convolve, Inc. Notice of Disclosures required by P.R. 4-2 (Albritton, Eric)
April 26, 2010 Filing 138 NOTICE of Disclosure by Dell Inc. , Western Digital Corporation, Hitachi Global Storage Technologies and Hitachi Ltd., of Defendants' Preliminary Claim Constructions and Extrinsic Evidence (Fulghum, Roger)
April 23, 2010 Filing 137 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #128 Opposed MOTION for Protective Order Motion and Memorandum in Support of thereof for Protective Order to prevent Defendant Hitachi from disclosing Convolve Inc.'s Confidential and Highly Confidential Discovery Material to Dr. Michael Sidman filed by Convolve, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit J)(Albritton, Eric)
April 23, 2010 Filing 136 NOTICE by Western Digital Corporation of Subpoena (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Barbastathis Subpoena), #2 Exhibit 2 (Machado Subpoena), #3 Exhibit 3 (Phinney Subpoena), #4 Exhibit 4 (Seering Subpoena), #5 Exhibit 5 (Souri Subpoena))(Werner, Thomas)
April 16, 2010 Filing 135 Additional Attachments to Main Document (Certificate of Service): #134 Response in Opposition to Motion,,.. (Lumish, Douglas) Modified on 4/16/2010 (sm, ).
April 15, 2010 Filing 134 RESPONSE in Opposition re #128 Opposed MOTION for Protective Order Motion and Memorandum in Support of thereof for Protective Order to prevent Defendant Hitachi from disclosing Convolve Inc.'s Confidential and Highly Confidential Discovery Material to Dr. Michael Sidman filed by Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Dr. Michael Sidman, #2 Exhibit A.1, #3 Exhibit A.2, #4 Exhibit A.3, #5 Exhibit B - Declaration of Sudip Kundu, #6 Exhibit B.1, #7 Exhibit B.2, #8 Exhibit C - Request for Judicial Notice, #9 Exhibit C.1, #10 Exhibit C.2)(Lumish, Douglas)
April 12, 2010 Filing 133 MOTION to Change Venue Defendants' Renewed Motion to Transfer Venue by Western Digital Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11)(Wessel, Bruce)
April 12, 2010 Filing 132 NOTICE by Dell Inc. Notice of Service of Defendants' Supplemental List of Claim Terms, Phrases, Clauses, and Elements (Fulghum, Roger)
April 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER - granting #130 Notice of Amended Docket Control Order. ORDERED that the following schedule of deadlines is in effect until further order of this court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 4/5/2010. (ch, )
April 1, 2010 Filing 130 NOTICE by Western Digital Corporation re #126 Order, Terminate Motions, Set Hearings,,, of Filing of Joint Proposed Amended Docket Control Order (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wessel, Bruce)
April 1, 2010 ***FILED IN ERROR, PROPOSED ORDER FILED AS STAND ALONE ENTRY. Document # 129, Submission of Agreed Order. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (sm, )
March 31, 2010 Filing 129 ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE.***Submission of Proposed Agreed Docket Control/Scheduling order by Western Digital Corporation Jointly on Behalf of All Parties Pursuant to the Court's March 24, 2010 Order. (Wessel, Bruce) Modified on 4/1/2010 (sm, ).
March 29, 2010 Filing 128 Opposed MOTION for Protective Order Motion and Memorandum in Support of thereof for Protective Order to prevent Defendant Hitachi from disclosing Convolve Inc.'s Confidential and Highly Confidential Discovery Material to Dr. Michael Sidman by Convolve, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Text of Proposed Order)(Albritton, Eric)
March 25, 2010 Filing 127 NOTICE of Hearing: Jury Selection set for 7/5/2011, 09:00 AM, and Pretrial Conference set for 6/27/2011, 01:30 PM, in Mag Ctrm (Marshall) before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham.(delat)
March 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 126 AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER - Jury Selection set for 7/5/2011 01:30PM before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham., Markman Hearing set for 9/9/2010 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham., Pretrial Conference set for 6/27/2011 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 3/24/10. (ehs, )
February 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediator. Hon. Robert W. Faulkner, appointed as mediator. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 2/25/10. (ehs, )
February 23, 2010 Filing 124 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Joint Motion to Amend the Docket Control Order by Western Digital Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Werner, Thomas)
January 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER granting #122 Motion for Leave to File to Amend it Local Patent Rule 3-1 and 3-2 Disclosures. Convolve is to serve Disclosures on dfts within three (3) business days of the entry of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 1/26/2010. (ch, )
January 25, 2010 Filing 122 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Convolve Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Leave to Amend its PR 3-1 Disclosures to Defendants by Convolve, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Albritton, Eric)
January 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 121 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 1/21/10. (ehs, )
January 18, 2010 Filing 120 Agreed MOTION for Protective Order Agreed Motion for Entry of Protective Order by Convolve, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Protective Order)(Albritton, Eric)
January 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER granting #105 Motion to modify the docket control order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 1/11/10. (ehs, )
January 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER granting #66 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 1/8/2010. (ch, )
December 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER granting #116 Motion for Leave to Amend Invalidity Contentions. ORDERS Defendants to serve their amended invalidity contentions on Plaintiff Convolve within three (3) business days of the entry of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 12/30/09. (ch, )
December 29, 2009 Filing 116 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File to Amend Defendants' Invalidity Contentions by Western Digital Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Werner, Thomas)
December 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER granting #114 Motion for Leave to File Amend its Local Patent Rule 3-1 and 3-2 Disclosures. ORDERS Convolve to serve its Amended Local Patent Rule 3- 1 and 3-2 Disclosures on Defendants within three (3) business days of the entry of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 12/18/09. (ch, )
December 16, 2009 Filing 114 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff;s Unopposed Motion for Leave to Amend its P.R. 3-1 & 3-2 Disclosures by Convolve, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Albritton, Eric)
December 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER granting #112 Motion to Amend docket control order. All parties make Exchange of Preliminary Claim Constructions and Extrinsic Evidence P.R. 4-2 January 18, 2010. All parties meet and confer to discuss Preliminary Claim Constructions and Extrinsic Evidence P.R. 4-2(c) January 25, 2010. All parties jointly file Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement P.R. 4-3 January 29, 2010. Deadline to join other parties without leave of Court, which shall be at least 60 days before the deadline for filing dispositive motions January 29, 2010. Completion of Claim Construction Discovery P.R. 4-4 February 26, 2010. Patentee files opening claim construction briefP.R. 4-5(a) March 12, 2010. Accused Infringer files responsive claim construction brief P.R. 4-5(b) March 26, 2010. Patentee files reply brief on claim construction P.R. 4-5(c) April 2, 2010. ONLY WITH LEAVE OF COURTAccused infringer files sur-reply brief on claim construction April 9, 2010.Parties file Joint Claim Construction ChartP.R. 4-5(d) April 16, 2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 12/14/09. (ehs, )
December 11, 2009 Filing 112 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Joint Motion to Amend the Docket Control Order by Convolve, Inc., Dell Inc., Western Digital Corporation, Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc., Hitachi Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Albritton, Eric)
December 8, 2009 Filing 111 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Adam A Biggs on behalf of Convolve, Inc. (Biggs, Adam)
December 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER granting #109 Motion to Amend docket control order. Deadline for parties to exchange preliminary Claim Construction and Extrinsic Evidence (PR4-2) extended to 12/11/09. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 12/3/09. (ehs, )
December 1, 2009 Filing 109 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Joint Motion to Amend the Docket Control Order by Convolve, Inc., Dell Inc., Western Digital Corporation, Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc., Hitachi Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Albritton, Eric)
November 19, 2009 Filing 108 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Reynaldo C Barcelo for Western Digital Corporation. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-1-5038 (ch, )
November 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER granting #106 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney William D Bowen terminated as counsel for Western Digital Corporation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 11/13/09. (ehs, )
November 10, 2009 Filing 106 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney re William D. Bowen by Western Digital Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wessel, Bruce)
November 10, 2009 Filing 105 Unopposed MOTION to Modify Discovery Order re Early Mediation Deadline by Western Digital Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wessel, Bruce)
October 12, 2009 Filing 104 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jack Wesley Hill on behalf of Convolve, Inc. (Hill, Jack)
September 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER denying #40 Motion to Change Venue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 9/30/09. (ch, )
September 28, 2009 Filing 102 REPLY to Response to Motion re #97 MOTION For Protection From Plaintiff Convolve, Inc.'s Notice of Rule 30(B)(6) Deposition filed by Dell Inc.. (Fulghum, Roger)
September 18, 2009 Filing 101 RESPONSE in Opposition re #97 MOTION For Protection From Plaintiff Convolve, Inc.'s Notice of Rule 30(B)(6) Deposition Convolve Inc.'s Response in Opposition to Dell Inc.'s Motion for Protection from Plaintiff's Notice of Rule 30 (b)(6) Deposition filed by Convolve, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Albritton, Eric)
September 18, 2009 Filing 100 NOTICE of Disclosure by Convolve, Inc. Plaintiff Notice of Disclosure of Asserted Claims (Albritton, Eric)
September 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER granting #98 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Stephen R Risley terminated for pltf. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 9/11/09. (ehs, )
September 8, 2009 Filing 98 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Withdraw Stephen Risley as Counsel of Record by Convolve, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Albritton, Eric)
September 3, 2009 Filing 97 MOTION For Protection From Plaintiff Convolve, Inc.'s Notice of Rule 30(B)(6) Deposition by Dell Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Fulghum, Roger)
August 24, 2009 Filing 96 NOTICE of Disclosure by Dell Inc., Western Digital Corporation, Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc. (Fulghum, Roger)
August 24, 2009 Filing 95 NOTICE of Disclosure by Convolve, Inc. Pursuant to Patent Rule 4-1(a) (Albritton, Eric)
August 21, 2009 Filing 94 NOTICE by Western Digital Corporation PURSUANT TO PARAGRAPH 5 OF THE COURTS DISCOVERY ORDER (Wessel, Bruce)
August 21, 2009 Filing 93 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Bradley Bowling on behalf of Dell Inc. (Bowling, Bradley)
August 21, 2009 Filing 92 NOTICE by Convolve, Inc. Convolve's Notice Pursuant to Paragraph 5 of the Discovery Order (Albritton, Eric)
July 28, 2009 Filing 91 NOTICE by Dell Inc. of Service of Privilege Log (Fulghum, Roger)
July 27, 2009 Filing 90 NOTICE by Convolve, Inc. Plaintiff's Notice of Service of Privilege Log (Albritton, Eric)
July 27, 2009 Filing 89 NOTICE of Disclosure by Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc., Hitachi Ltd. Notice of Service of Privilege Log (Findlay, Eric)
July 24, 2009 Filing 88 NOTICE of Disclosure by Western Digital Corporation PURSUANT TO PARAGRAPH 5 OF THE COURTS DISCOVERY ORDER (Wessel, Bruce)
June 29, 2009 Filing 87 NOTICE of Disclosure by Dell Inc. (Fulghum, Roger)
June 29, 2009 Filing 86 NOTICE of Disclosure by Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc., Hitachi Ltd. Notice of Disclosure Pursuant to Paragraph 3 of the Court's Discovery Order (Findlay, Eric)
June 26, 2009 Filing 85 NOTICE of Disclosure by Western Digital Corporation (Wessel, Bruce)
June 26, 2009 Filing 84 NOTICE of Disclosure by Western Digital Corporation re Amended Initial Disclosures (Wessel, Bruce)
June 26, 2009 Filing 83 NOTICE of Disclosure by Convolve, Inc. First Supplemental (Albritton, Eric)
June 26, 2009 Filing 82 NOTICE by Convolve, Inc. Re: Computation of Damages (Albritton, Eric)
June 26, 2009 Filing 81 NOTICE of Disclosure by Convolve, Inc. (Albritton, Eric)
June 25, 2009 Filing 80 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Thomas C Werner for Western Digital Corporation. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-1-4775(ch, )
June 25, 2009 Filing 79 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney William D Bowen for Western Digital Corporation. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-1-4775 (ch, )
June 18, 2009 Filing 78 NOTICE of Disclosure by Western Digital Corporation of Compliance with P.R. 3-3 and 3-4 (Wessel, Bruce)
June 17, 2009 Filing 77 NOTICE of Disclosure by Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc., Hitachi Ltd. Notice of Compliance with Patent Rule 3-3 and 3-4 (Findlay, Eric)
June 17, 2009 Filing 76 NOTICE by Dell Inc. of Compliance with P.R. 3-3 and 3-4 (Fulghum, Roger)
June 9, 2009 Filing 75 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Tammy M Pennington on behalf of Dell Inc. (Pennington, Tammy)
May 8, 2009 Filing 74 NOTICE by Western Digital Corporation of Notice of Service of Initial Disclosures (Wessel, Bruce)
May 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER granting #71 Motion for Extension of Time to File deft's Western Digital Corporations Initial Disclosure Statement. Deadline extended to 5/8/09. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 5/5/09. (ehs, )
May 5, 2009 Filing 72 NOTICE by Dell Inc. of Service of Initial Disclosures (Fulghum, Roger)
May 4, 2009 Filing 71 ***REPLACES DOC#70***Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Initial Disclosure Statement by Western Digital Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Glasscock, Harold) Modified on 5/4/2009 (ch, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/5/2009: #2 REVISED ORDER) (ch, ).
May 4, 2009 Filing 70 ***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY. PLEASE IGNORE***Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Initial Disclosure Statement by Western Digital Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Glasscock, Harold) Modified on 5/4/2009 (ch, ).
May 4, 2009 ***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY Document # 70, Unopposed Motion. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ATTORNEY REFILED SEE CORRECTED DOCUMENT # 71)(ch, )
May 1, 2009 Filing 69 NOTICE of Disclosure by Convolve, Inc. Pursuant to P.R. 3-1 and 3-2 (Anderson, A)
May 1, 2009 Filing 68 NOTICE of Disclosure by Convolve, Inc. (Carr, Anna)
May 1, 2009 Filing 67 NOTICE of Disclosure by Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc., Hitachi Ltd. (Findlay, Eric)
April 2, 2009 Filing 66 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Convolve, Inc., Dell Inc., Western Digital Corporation, Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc., Hitachi Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ward, Thomas)
March 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER granting #64 Motion for Extension of Time to File Protective Order. Deadline is extended to 4/2/09. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 3/20/09. (ch, )
March 19, 2009 Filing 64 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Convolve, Inc.'s by Convolve, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Albritton, Eric) Modified on 3/19/2009 (sm, ).
March 17, 2009 Filing 63 Agreed MOTION Agreed Motion to Appoint Mediator by Convolve, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Albritton, Eric)
March 12, 2009 Filing 62 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney David C Dotson for Convolve, Inc. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-1-4564. (ch, )
March 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 61 DOCKET CONTROL ORDER - Amended Pleadings due by 6/30/2010. Discovery due by 2/12/2010. Expert Witness List due by 9/2/2010. Joinder of Parties due by 1/15/2010. Markman Hearing set for 5/11/2010 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham. Jury Selection set for 3/10/2011 09:00AM before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham. Pretrial Conference set for 2/18/2011 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 3/6/09. (ehs, )
March 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 60 DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 3/6/09. (ehs, )
March 3, 2009 Filing 59 Joint MOTION for Discovery Order by Convolve, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Discovery Order)(Albritton, Eric) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/4/2009: #2 Text of Proposed Order) (sm, ).
March 3, 2009 Filing 58 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Hitachi Ltd. identifying Corporate Parent None for Hitachi Ltd.. (Findlay, Eric)
February 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER assigning case to Judge Everingham by consent of the parties for all further proceedings and entry of judgment. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 2/24/09. (ehs, )
February 24, 2009 Filing 56 CONSENT to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham. (ehs, )
February 17, 2009 Filing 55 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham: Scheduling Conference held on 2/17/2009. (Jan Lockhart, ECRO.) (jml)
February 16, 2009 Filing 54 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Charles Smith on behalf of Dell Inc. (Smith, Michael)
February 13, 2009 Filing 53 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Docket Control Order with March 7, 2011 Final Pre Trial Conference, #2 Exhibit B - Proposed Docket Control Order with October 3, 2011 Final Pre Trial Conference)(Albritton, Eric) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/17/2009: #3 Revised Order (Exh A), #4 Revised Order (Exh B)) (sm, ).
February 6, 2009 Filing 52 ANSWER to #45 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim Convolve, Inc.'s Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Hitachi, LTD's Counterclaims by Convolve, Inc..(Albritton, Eric)
January 26, 2009 Filing 51 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #40 MOTION to Change Venue Defendants' Motion to Transfer Plaintiff Convolve Inc.'s Sur-Reply to Defendants' Reply Regarding Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue filed by Convolve, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I, #2 Exhibit J)(Albritton, Eric)
January 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 50 Notice of Scheduling Conference, Proposed Deadlines for Docket Control Order and Discovery Order. Scheduling Conference set for 2/17/2009 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 1/26/09. (ch, )
January 21, 2009 Filing 49 NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 2/17/2009 02:00 PM in Mag Ctrm (Marshall) before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham. (jml, )
January 20, 2009 Filing 48 NOTICE by Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc., Hitachi Ltd. Notice of Change of Contact Information for Eric Findlay and Brian Craft (Findlay, Eric)
January 14, 2009 Filing 47 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #46 Reply to Response to Motion.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Sudip Kundu, #2 Exhibit L)(Findlay, Eric)
January 14, 2009 Filing 46 REPLY to Response to Motion re #40 MOTION to Change Venue Defendants' Motion to Transfer filed by Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc.. (Findlay, Eric)
January 14, 2009 Filing 45 ANSWER to #12 Amended Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against Convolve, Inc. by Hitachi Ltd..(Findlay, Eric)
January 12, 2009 Filing 44 ANSWER to #33 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim Convolve, Inc.'s Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Western Digital Corporation's Counterclaims by Convolve, Inc..(Albritton, Eric)
January 12, 2009 Filing 43 ANSWER to #37 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim Convolve, Inc.'s Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc.'s Counterclaims by Convolve, Inc..(Albritton, Eric)
January 12, 2009 Filing 42 ANSWER to #36 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim Convolve, Inc.'s Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Dell, Inc.'s Counterclaims by Convolve, Inc..(Albritton, Eric)
January 7, 2009 Filing 41 RESPONSE to Motion re #40 MOTION to Change Venue Defendants' Motion to Transfer Convolve Inc.'s Response to Defendants Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc., Dell Inc., and Western Digital Corporation's Motion to Transfer Venue filed by Convolve, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H, #9 Text of Proposed Order)(Albritton, Eric)
December 23, 2008 Filing 40 MOTION to Change Venue Defendants' Motion to Transfer by Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit of Anne Kiernan, #3 Affidavit of Sudip Kundu, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit F, #10 Exhibit G, #11 Exhibit H, #12 Exhibit I, #13 Exhibit J, #14 Exhibit K)(Findlay, Eric)
December 19, 2008 Filing 39 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Dell Inc. (Fulghum, Roger)
December 19, 2008 Filing 38 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Hitachi Global Storage Technologies Netherlands, B.V., Corporate Parent Hitachi Ltd. for Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc.. (Findlay, Eric)
December 19, 2008 Filing 37 ANSWER to #12 Amended Complaint, Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against Convolve, Inc. by Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc..(Findlay, Eric)
December 19, 2008 Filing 36 Dell's ANSWER to #12 Amended Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against Convolve, Inc. by Dell Inc..(Fulghum, Roger)
December 19, 2008 Filing 35 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joshua J Parker on behalf of Dell Inc. (Parker, Joshua)
December 19, 2008 Filing 34 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Western Digital Corporation (Wessel, Bruce)
December 19, 2008 Filing 33 ANSWER to #12 Amended Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against Convolve, Inc. by Western Digital Corporation.(Wessel, Bruce)
December 17, 2008 Filing 32 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Bruce A Wessel for Western Digital Corporation. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-1-4333 (ch, )
November 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #29 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Hilda Contreras Galvan terminated as counsel for Hitachi Global Storage Technologies Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 11/25/08. (ch, )
November 21, 2008 Filing 30 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric Hugh Findlay on behalf of Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc. (Findlay, Eric)
November 21, 2008 Filing 29 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Galvan, Hilda)
November 20, 2008 Filing 28 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Patricia E Chow for Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc. and Hitachi Ltd.. (APPROVED FEE PAID 2-1-4250) (ehs, )
November 20, 2008 Filing 27 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Douglas E Lumish for Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc. and Hitachi Ltd. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 2-1-4250. (ch, )
November 20, 2008 Filing 26 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Sudip Kundu for Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc. and Hitachi Ltd.. (APPROVED FEE PAID 2-1-4250) (ehs, )
November 20, 2008 Filing 25 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Jason D Kipnis for Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc. and Hitachi Ltd. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 2-1-4250. (ch, )
November 19, 2008 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc. to 12/19/2008. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
November 18, 2008 Filing 24 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc..( Craft, Roger)
November 18, 2008 Filing 23 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Roger Brian Craft on behalf of Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc. (Craft, Roger)
November 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Deadline for Dell to answer first amended complaint extended to 12/19/08. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 11/7/08. (ehs, )
November 3, 2008 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Western Digital Corporation to 12/19/2008. 45 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mpv, )
November 3, 2008 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc. to 11/18/2008. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mpv, )
October 31, 2008 Filing 21 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Harold Kip Glasscock, Jr on behalf of Western Digital Corporation (Glasscock, Harold)
October 31, 2008 Filing 20 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Roger Joseph Fulghum on behalf of Dell Inc. (Fulghum, Roger)
October 31, 2008 Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond To The First Amended Complaint by Dell Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Partridge, Scott)
October 31, 2008 Filing 18 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Scott F Partridge on behalf of Dell Inc. (Partridge, Scott)
October 31, 2008 Filing 17 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Western Digital Corporation.( Glasscock, Harold)
October 31, 2008 Filing 16 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc..( Galvan, Hilda)
October 23, 2008 Filing 15 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Convolve, Inc.. Dell Inc. served on 10/13/2008, answer due 11/3/2008. (ehs, )
October 23, 2008 Filing 14 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Convolve, Inc.. Western Digital Corporation served on 10/13/2008, answer due 11/3/2008. (ehs, )
October 23, 2008 Filing 13 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Convolve, Inc.. Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc. served on 10/13/2008, answer due 11/3/2008. (ehs, )
October 10, 2008 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Dell Inc., Western Digital Corporation, Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc., Hitachi Ltd., filed by Convolve, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Albritton, Eric)
September 25, 2008 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Dell Inc., Western Digital Corporation, Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc., Hitachi Ltd.. (ch, )
July 3, 2008 Filing 11 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Stephen R Risley for Convolve, Inc. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 2-1-3929 (ch, )
July 3, 2008 Filing 10 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Jacqueline R Knapp for Convolve, Inc. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 2-1-3929. (ch, )
July 3, 2008 Filing 9 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Anna R Carr for Convolve, Inc. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 2-1-3929. (ch, )
July 3, 2008 Filing 8 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Marla R Butler for Convolve, Inc. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 2-1-3929. (ch, ) (ch, ).
July 3, 2008 Filing 7 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney A James Anderson for Convolve, Inc. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 2-1-3929. (ch, )
June 23, 2008 Filing 6 Magistrate Consent Form Mailed to Convolve, Inc. (ehs, )
June 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Chad Everingham IV. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 6/18/08. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 6/18/08. (ehs, )
June 18, 2008 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas John Ward, Jr on behalf of Convolve, Inc. (Ward, Thomas)
June 18, 2008 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (NO Parent) filed by Convolve, Inc. (Albritton, Eric) Modified on 6/18/2008 (sm, ).
June 18, 2008 Filing 2 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Albritton, Eric)
June 18, 2008 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Dell Inc., Western Digital Corporation, Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc., Hitachi Ltd. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 05400000000001582566.), filed by Convolve, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Albritton, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Convolve, Inc. v. Dell Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Digital Corporation
Represented By: William D Bowen
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Represented By: David A Schwarz
Represented By: Douglas E Lumish
Represented By: Garland A Kelley
Represented By: Jeffrey G. Homrig
Represented By: Roger Joseph Fulghum
Represented By: Bruce A Wessel
Represented By: Eric Hugh Findlay
Represented By: Joseph H Lee
Represented By: Harry Lee Gillam, Jr
Represented By: Harold Kip Glasscock, Jr
Represented By: Reynaldo C Barcelo
Represented By: Thomas C Werner
Represented By: Richard Marc Birnholz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Hilda Contreras Galvan
Represented By: Roger Brian Craft
Represented By: Patricia E Chow
Represented By: Jeremy Jason Lang
Represented By: Jeffrey G. Homrig
Represented By: Roger Joseph Fulghum
Represented By: Eric Hugh Findlay
Represented By: Joseph H Lee
Represented By: Jason D Kipnis
Represented By: Douglas E Lumish
Represented By: Sudip Kundu
Represented By: Patricia Young
Represented By: Joseph Shear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dell Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Scott Ponder
Represented By: Amanda Woodall
Represented By: Tammy M Pennington Rhodes
Represented By: Michael Charles Smith
Represented By: Jeffrey G. Homrig
Represented By: Roger Joseph Fulghum
Represented By: Scott F Partridge
Represented By: Bradley Bowling
Represented By: Deron R Dacus
Represented By: Marcus T Hall
Represented By: Kathleen B Barry
Represented By: Joshua J Parker
Represented By: Kimball R Anderson
Represented By: Gene C Schaerr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hitachi Ltd.
Represented By: Roger Brian Craft
Represented By: Patricia E Chow
Represented By: Jeremy Jason Lang
Represented By: Jeffrey G. Homrig
Represented By: Roger Joseph Fulghum
Represented By: Eric Hugh Findlay
Represented By: Joseph H Lee
Represented By: Jason D Kipnis
Represented By: Douglas E Lumish
Represented By: Sudip Kundu
Represented By: Patricia Young
Represented By: Joseph Shear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Convolve, Inc.
Represented By: Adam A Biggs
Represented By: Trevor John Foster
Represented By: Tara S G Sharp
Represented By: Jacqueline K Burt
Represented By: A James Anderson
Represented By: Stephen E. Edwards
Represented By: Brenda L Joly
Represented By: Ailis L Burpee
Represented By: Jack Wesley Hill
Represented By: Eric M. Albritton
Represented By: David C Dotson
Represented By: Elizabeth V Thomas
Represented By: Bryan J Vogel
Represented By: Thomas John Ward, Jr
Represented By: Stephen R Risley
Represented By: Jennifer A Adler
Represented By: Anna Carr Halsey
Represented By: Marla R Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Robert W Faulkner
Represented By: Robert W Faulkner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?