Actus, LLC v. Bank of America Corp. et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Actus, LLC
Defendant: Bank of America Corp., Blaze Mobile, Inc., Capital One Financial Corporation, Enable Holdings, Inc., Google, Inc., Green Dot, Corp., Javien Digital Payment Solutions, Inc., JP Morgan Chase & Co., MasterCard International, LLC, Meta Financial Group, Inc., M&T Bank Corporation, Obopay, Inc., Sonic Solutions, Visa, Inc., Vivendi Universal S.A., Inc. Wal-Mart Stores, Walt Disney Co, Western Union, WildTangent, Inc. and AgileCo
Case Number: 2:2009cv00102
Filed: April 9, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Patent Office
County: Harrison
Presiding Judge: T. John Ward
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2010. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 281 ORDER granting 280 Motion to Dismiss all claims with prejudice and all counterclaims as moot asserted between Plaintiff Actus, LLC and Defendant Capital One Financial Corporation. All attorneys fees and costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 9/15/10. (ehs, )
September 13, 2010 Filing 280 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice by Capital One Financial Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gilstrap, James)
July 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 8/30/2010 09:30 AM before Judge T. John Ward. (ehs, )
July 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 279 ORDER - This case is set for a status conference in Marshall, Texas, on August 30, 2010, at 9:30 a.m.. The purpose of the conference will be to assign a claim construction hearing date and a trial setting. The parties shall submit their proposed docket control and discovery orders to the court on September 13, 2010. If the parties are unable to resolve their disagreements concerning these orders, the parties shall submit to the court their competing proposals along with a summary of their disagreements. For purposes of computing the time deadlines under the local patent rules, the court deems September 29, 2010 to be the date of the initial case management conference. As a result, theDisclosure of Asserted Claims and Infringement Contentions is due on September 17, 2010.. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 7/21/10. (ehs, )
June 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 278 ORDER - granting 276 Notice of Dismissal. All claims asserted against Dft Javien Digital Payment Solutions Inc are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 6/15/2010. (ch, )
June 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 277 ORDER - granting 275 Notice of Dismissal. All claims asserted against Dft Blaze Mobile Inc. be dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 6/15/2010. (ch, )
May 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 276 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Actus, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William)
May 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 275 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Actus, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William)
April 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 274 ORDER granting Plts' 272 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Actus, LLC as to deft Visa Inc. All claims and counterclaims are dismissed with prejudice subject to the terms of certain agreement. All attorneys' fees and costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 4/30/10. (ehs, )
April 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 273 ORDER granting Pltf's 271 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Actus, LLC as tp deft M&T Bank Corporation. All claims dismissed with prejudice, all attorney fees and costs are to be borne by the party incurring same. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 4/30/10. (ehs, )
April 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 272 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Visa, Inc. with Prejudice by Actus, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William)
April 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 271 STIPULATION of Dismissal of M&T Bank Corporation with Prejudice by Actus, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William)
April 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 270 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Grant Fairbairn for Enable Holdings, Inc.,Grant Fairbairn for Enable Holdings, Inc.(RECEIPT 2-1-5295). (rml, )
April 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 269 ANSWER to 253 Amended Complaint, by Capital One Financial Corporation.(Gilstrap, James)
March 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 268 RESPONSE to 259 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim of Defendant M&T Bank Corporation by Actus, LLC. (Davis, William)
March 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 267 RESPONSE to 262 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim of Defendant Enable Holdings, Inc. by Actus, LLC. (Davis, William)
March 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 266 RESPONSE to 258 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim of Defendant Visa, Inc. by Actus, LLC. (Davis, William)
March 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Defendant's Unopposed Fourth Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Capital One Financial Corporation to 4/1/2010. 10 business days Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
March 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 265 ORDER granting 263 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Actus, LLC as to deft Western Union Financial SErvices Inc. All attorneys' fees and costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 3/10/10. (ehs, )
March 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 264 Defendant's Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Third Amended Complaint re Capital One Financial Corporation.( Gilstrap, James)
March 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 263 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Western Union Financial Services, Inc. with Prejudice by Actus, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William)
March 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Defendant's Unopposed Third Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Capital One Financial Corporation to 3/18/2010. 10 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
March 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 262 ANSWER to 253 Amended Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against Actus, LLC by Enable Holdings, Inc..(Findlay, Eric)
March 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 261 Defendant's Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Third Amended Complaint for Patent Infringement re Capital One Financial Corporation.( Gilstrap, James)
March 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 260 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by M&T Bank Corporation (Lynn, Michael)
March 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 259 ANSWER to 253 Amended Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM in Reply to Third Amended Complaint for Patent Infringement against M&T Bank Corporation by M&T Bank Corporation.(Lynn, Michael)
March 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 258 ANSWER to 253 Amended Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM in Reply to Third Amended Complaint for Patent Infringement against Visa, Inc. by Visa, Inc..(Lynn, Michael)
March 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 257 ANSWER to 253 Amended Complaint, (Third Amended Complaint), COUNTERCLAIM against Actus, LLC by Western Union Financial Services Inc.(Bunt, Robert)
March 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 256 RESPONSE to 255 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim of Defendant Meta Financial Group, Inc. by Actus, LLC. (Davis, William)
February 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 255 ANSWER to 253 Amended Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against Actus, LLC by Meta Financial Group, Inc..(Barr, John)
February 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 254 ORDER granting 252 Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 2/19/10. (ehs, )
February 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 253 AMENDED COMPLAINT Third Amended Complaint against Meta Financial Group, Inc., M&T Bank Corporation, Visa, Inc., Western Union Financial Services Inc, Blaze Mobile, Inc., Capital One Financial Corporation, Enable Holdings, Inc., Javien Digital Payment Solutions, Inc., filed by Actus, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, U.S. Patent 7,328,189, # 2 Exhibit B, U.S. Patent No. 7,249,099, # 3 Exhibit C, U.S. Patent No. 7,177,838, # 4 Exhibit D, U.S. Patent No. 7,376,621)(Davis, William)
February 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 252 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint by Actus, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, Third Amended Complaint, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William)
February 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 251 ORDER granting 250 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Actus, LLC as to deft Disney Gift Card Services Inc with prejudice. All attorneys' fees and costs to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 2/16/10. (ehs, )
February 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 250 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Disney Gift Card Services, Inc. with Prejudice by Actus, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William)
February 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 249 ORDER granting 247 Motion to Dismiss all claims and counterclaims asserted in this suit between Plaintiff, Actus, LLC, and Defendant, MasterCard International, Inc., are hereby dismissed with prejudice. It is further ORDERED that all attorneys fees and costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 2/12/10. (ehs, )
February 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 248 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION AND ORDER - Defendants motion to dismiss is premature and must be DENIED. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 2/10/2010. (ch, )
February 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 247 Joint MOTION to Dismiss MasterCard International, Inc. with Prejudice by Actus, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William)
January 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 246 ORDER - granting 245 Stipulation of Dismissal. All claims and counterclaims asserted between Actus LLC and dfts Vivendi Universal US Holding Co. and Vivendi Universal SA are hereby dismissed with prejudice and pending motions are dismissed as moot. All attorney fees and costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 1/26/2010. (ch, )
January 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 245 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Vivendi Universal U.S. Holding Co. and Vivendi Universal, SA with Prejudice by Actus, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William)
January 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 244 ORDER granting 243 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendants Vivendi Universal U.S. Holding Co. and Vivendi Universal, SAs Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Responses due by 1/22/2010. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 1/12/10. (ehs, )
January 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 243 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 104 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Claims and Memorandum of Law in Support of Vivendi Universal U.S. Holding Co. and Vivendi Universal, SA by Actus, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William)
January 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 242 ORDER granting 241 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Actus, LLC as to deft Green Dot Corporation. All claims asserted in this suit between Plaintiff and Defendant are hereby dismissed with prejudice and all counterclaims are dismissed as moot, subject to the terms of that certain agreement entitled "SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT" dated December 22, 2009. It is further ORDERED that all attorneys' fees and costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 1/5/10. (ehs, )
December 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 241 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice of Green Dot Corporation by Actus, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William)
December 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 240 ORDER granting 239 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 104 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Claims and Memorandum of Law in Support Responses due by 1/9/2010. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 12/10/09. (ch, )
December 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 239 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 104 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Claims and Memorandum of Law in Support by Actus, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William)
November 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 238 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 188 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Counts I and II of Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint filed by Actus, LLC. (Davis, William)
November 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 237 ORDER granting 234 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Michael E Jones terminated as counsel for Dft M&T Bank Corporation. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 11/24/09. (ch, )
November 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 236 ORDER granting 235 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendants Vivendi Universal U.S. Holding Co. and Vivendi Universal, SAs Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Responses due by 12/11/2009. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 11/23/09. (ehs, )
November 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 235 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 104 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Claims and Memorandum of Law in Support by Actus, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William)
November 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 234 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Michael E. Jones and the Potter Minton, P.C. law firm by M&T Bank Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
November 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 233 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric Wolf Pinker on behalf of M&T Bank Corporation (Pinker, Eric)
November 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 232 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael P Lynn on behalf of M&T Bank Corporation (Lynn, Michael)
November 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 231 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mark Edward Turk on behalf of M&T Bank Corporation (Turk, Mark)
November 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 230 REPLY to Response to Motion re 188 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Counts I and II filed by MasterCard International Incorp., Meta Financial Group, Inc., M&T Bank Corporation, Visa, Inc., Capital One Financial Corporation, Enable Holdings, Inc., Green Dot, Corp.. (Barr, John)
November 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 229 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Matthew N Bathon for M&T Bank Corporation. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-1-4687 (ch, )
November 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 228 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Joseph A Micallef for M&T Bank Corporation. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-1-4690(ch, )
November 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 227 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Scott M Border for M&T Bank Corporation. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-1-4688 (ch, )
November 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 226 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney David P Gersch for M&T Bank Corporation. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-1-4689 (ch, )
November 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 225 ORDER granting 224 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Actus, LLC as to deft JPMorgan Chase & Co. All attorneys; fees and costs are to be borne by the party that incurred the same. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 11/12/09. (ehs, )
November 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 224 STIPULATION of Dismissal of JP Morgan Chase & Co. by Actus, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William)
November 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 223 ORDER granting 222 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendants Vivendi Universal U.S. Holding Co. and Vivendi Universal, SAs Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Responses due by 11/19/2009. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 11/6/09. (ehs, )
November 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 222 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 104 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Claims and Memorandum of Law in Support by Actus, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William)
November 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 221 ORDER granting 220 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply to Plaintiffs Response to the Motion to Dismiss. Replies due by 11/18/2009. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 11/3/09. (ehs, )
November 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 220 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 207 Response to Motion, by MasterCard International Incorp.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
October 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 219 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge T. John Ward for all further proceedings. Judge David Folsom no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 10/29/09. (ch, )
October 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 218 ORDER granting 217 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Actus, LLC; Wal-Mart Stores terminated.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 10/28/09. (mrm, )
October 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 217 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. by Actus, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William)
October 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 216 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge T. John Ward recused. Case reassigned to Judge David Folsom for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 10/26/09. (ch, )
October 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Answer Due Deadline Updated for Inc. Wal-Mart Stores to 11/9/2009. (ch, )
October 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 215 ORDER granting 211 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Dft Wal-mart deadline is extended to 11/9/09. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 10/22/09. (ch, )
October 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ORDER granting 210 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 104 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Claims and Memorandum of Law in Support Responses due by 11/5/2009. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 10/22/09. (ch, )
October 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 213 ORDER granting 209 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 188 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Responses due by 11/4/2009. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 10/22/09. (ch, )
October 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 212 ORDER - granting 208 Stipulation of Dismissal. Claim against Dft Google Inc are hereby dismissed with prejudice. All attorney fees and costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 10/22/09. (ch, )
October 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 211 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 174 Amended Complaint by Inc. Wal-Mart Stores. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Roodman, David)
October 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 210 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 104 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Claims and Memorandum of Law in Support by Actus, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William)
October 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 209 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 188 Joint MOTION to Dismiss by MasterCard International Incorp.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
October 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 208 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Google, Inc. by Actus, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William)
October 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 207 RESPONSE to Motion re 188 Joint MOTION to Dismiss of Defendants Bank of America, Capital One, Enable Holdings, Green Dot, JP Morgan, Mastercard, Meta, M&T Bank, and Visa filed by Actus, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Patent No. 7,328,189, # 2 Exhibit Patent No. 7,249,099, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William)
September 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 206 ORDER granting 205 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Google Inc. deadline is extended to 10/20/09. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 9/30/09. (ch, )
September 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 205 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 174 Amended Complaint Google Inc.'s Fifth Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Second Amended Complaint by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gillam, Harry)
September 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Answer Due Deadline Updated for Inc. Wal-Mart Stores to 10/19/2009. (ehs, )
September 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORDER granting 203 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. has until October 19, 2009 to file an answer or otherwise respond to the Plaintiffs Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 9/28/09. (ehs, )
September 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 203 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 174 Amended Complaint (Second Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint) by Inc. Wal-Mart Stores. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Michael)
September 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ORDER granting 201 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 188 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Responses due by 10/14/2009. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 9/24/09. (ch, )
September 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 201 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 188 Joint MOTION to Dismiss by Actus, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William)
September 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 200 ORDER granting 197 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 104 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Claims and Memorandum of Law in Support Responses due by 10/20/2009. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 9/17/09. (ch, )
September 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ORDER - 196 Stipulation of Dismissal. All claims and counterclaims asserted between Plaintiff and Bank of America Corporation is hereby dismissed with prejudice. All attorney fees and costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 9/17/09. (ch, )
September 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER - granting 191 Stipulation of Dismissal. Sonic Solutions is hereby dismissed with prejudice. All attorney fees and costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 9/17/09. (ch, )
September 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 197 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 104 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Claims and Memorandum of Law in Support by Actus, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William)
September 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 196 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Bank of America by Actus, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William)
September 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Answer Due Deadline Updated for Inc. Wal-Mart Stores to 9/28/2009. (ch, )
September 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER granting 183 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Dft Wal-Mart Stores Inc. deadline is extended to 9/28/09. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 9/10/09. (ch, )
September 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Answer Due Deadline Updated for Bank of America Corp. to 9/22/2009. (ch, )
September 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER granting 181 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Dft Bank of America Corporations deadline is extended to 9/22/09. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 9/10/09. (ch, )
September 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 193 RESPONSE to 186 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim of Defendant Disney Gift Card Services, Inc. by Actus, LLC. (Davis, William)
September 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 192 RESPONSE to 184 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim of Western Union Financial Services, Inc. by Actus, LLC. (Davis, William)
September 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 191 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Sonic Solutions by Actus, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William)
September 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 190 NOTICE of Designation of Attorney in Charge to David E Sipiora on behalf of The Disney Gift Card Services Inc (Sipiora, David)
September 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 189 NOTICE by The Disney Gift Card Services Inc DESIGNATING DAVID SIPIORA AS LEAD COUNSEL (Bunt, Robert)
September 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 188 Joint MOTION to Dismiss by MasterCard International Incorp., Meta Financial Group, Inc., M&T Bank Corporation, Visa, Inc., Capital One Financial Corporation, Enable Holdings, Inc., Green Dot, Corp., JP Morgan Chase & Co.. Bank of America Corp. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gilstrap, James) Modified on 9/9/2009 (ch, ).
September 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 187 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by The Disney Gift Card Services Inc identifying Corporate Parent Disney Enterprises, Inc. for The Disney Gift Card Services Inc. (Bunt, Robert)
September 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 186 Disney Gift Card Services, Inc.'s ANSWER to 174 Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Actus, LLC by The Disney Gift Card Services Inc.(Bunt, Robert)
September 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 185 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Western Union Financial Services Inc identifying Corporate Parent The Western Union Company for Western Union Financial Services Inc. (Bunt, Robert)
September 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 184 Western Union Financial Services, Inc.'s ANSWER to 174 Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Actus, LLC by Western Union Financial Services Inc.(Bunt, Robert)
September 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 183 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 174 Amended Complaint (Amended) by Inc. Wal-Mart Stores. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Michael)
September 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 182 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 174 Amended Complaint by Inc. Wal-Mart Stores. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Michael)
September 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 181 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Bank of America Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wille, David)
September 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Answer Due Deadline Updated for Google, Inc. to 9/29/2009. (ehs, )
September 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER granting 179 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. GOOGLE INC. will file its Answer on or before September 29, 2009. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 9/2/09. (ehs, )
August 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 179 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 174 Amended Complaint Google Inc.'s Fourth Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Responde to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gillam, Harry)
August 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER - granting 175 Stipulation of Dismissal. All claims asserted between plaintiff and dft Obopay, Inc. are hereby dismissed with prejudice. All counterclaims are dismissed as moot. All attorney fees and costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 8/27/09. (ch, )
August 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 177 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Kenneth S Chang for Disney Gift Card Services Inc. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-1-4882) (ehs, )
August 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 175 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Actus, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William)
August 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 176 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Ryan D Phillips for The Disney Gift Card Services. Inc. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-1-4882 (ch, ) Modified on 8/27/2009 (ch, ).
August 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 174 AMENDED COMPLAINT Second Amended Complaint against all defendants, filed by Actus, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit)(Davis, William)
August 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER granting 171 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 104 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Claims and Memorandum of Law in Support Responses due by 9/17/2009. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 8/13/09. (ch, )
August 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER granting 170 Motion for Leave to File. ORDERED that the Motions to Dismiss found at docket numbers 58, 77, 101, 114, 128, 142 are withdrawn without prejudice. It is further ORDERED that all Defendants shall have up to and including twenty-one (21) days from the date of entry of Actus Second Amended Complaint to answer or otherwise respond to said complaint. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 8/13/09. (ch, )
August 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 171 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 104 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Claims and Memorandum of Law in Support by Actus, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William)
August 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 170 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint, Withdraw Certain Motions to Dismiss, and Enlarged Time to Respond to Second Amended Complaint by Actus, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William)
August 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Answer Due Deadline Updated for M&T Bank Corporation to 8/24/2009. (ch, )
August 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER granting 166 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Amended Complaint. M&T Bank Corp deadline is 8/24/09. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 8/12/09. (ch, )
August 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Answer Due Deadline Updated for JP Morgan Chase & Co. to 8/14/2009. (ch, )
August 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER granting 165 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Amended Complaint. JP Morgan Chase & Co. deadline is extended to 8/14/09. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 8/12/09. (ch, )
August 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Answer Due Deadline Updated for Inc. Wal-Mart Stores to 8/28/2009. (ch, )
August 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER granting 164 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Amended Complaint. Deadline for Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. is extended to 8/28/09. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 8/12/09. (ch, )
August 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 166 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 4 Amended Complaint by M&T Bank Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
August 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 165 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to First Amended Complaint by JP Morgan Chase & Co.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Yarbrough, Herbert)
August 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 164 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 4 Amended Complaint by Inc. Wal-Mart Stores. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Michael)
August 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER - granting [160 Notice of Dismissal. All claims asserted against Dft AgileCo be dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 8/6/09. (ch, )
August 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER granting 159 Motion to Dismiss. All claims asserted in this suit between Plaintiff and Defendant WildTangent, Inc. are hereby dismissed with prejudice and all counterclaims are dismissed as moot, subject to the terms of that certain agreement entitled SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT dated 7/22/09. ORDER It is further ORDERED that all attorneys fees and costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 8/5/09. (ch, )
August 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Answer Due Deadline Updated for Walt Disney Co to 8/17/2009. (ch, )
August 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER granting 158 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Dft The Walt Disnes Co. deadline is extended to 8/17/09. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 8/5/09. (ch, )
August 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 160 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Actus, LLC (Davis, William) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/5/2009: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (sm, ).
August 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 159 Joint MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice by Actus, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William)
August 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 158 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 4 Amended Complaint UNOPPOSED by Walt Disney Co. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bunt, Robert)
July 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER granting 151 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Respond to Defendant Capital One Financial Corp.s Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Responses due by 8/20/2009. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 7/31/09. (ehs, )
July 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER granting 150 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendant Green Dot Corporations Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Responses due by 8/25/2009. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 7/31/09. (ehs, )
July 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER granting 149 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendant Bank of America Corporations Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Responses due by 8/18/2009. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 7/31/09. (ehs, )
July 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER granting 148 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Plaintiff Actus, LLC may file its Response to MasterCard International, Inc.s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Claims Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(1), 12 (B)(6) and 12(B)(7) and Memorandum of Law in Support on or before August 18, 2009. It is further ORDERED that Defendant MasterCard International, Inc. may file a Reply in Support of its Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Claims Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(1), 12 (B)(6) and 12(B)(7) and Memorandum of Law in Support on or before September 11, 2009. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 7/31/09. (ehs, )
July 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER granting 147 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendant Visa, Inc.s Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Responses due by 8/25/2009. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 7/31/09. (ehs, )
July 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER granting 146 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Court extends the date for Sonic to serve a response to Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint up to and including August 14, 2009.. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 7/31/09. (ehs, )
July 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 151 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Actus, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William)
July 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 150 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Actus, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William)
July 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 149 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Actus, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William)
July 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 148 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Actus, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William)
July 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 147 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Actus, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William)
July 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 146 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 4 Amended Complaint by Sonic Solutions. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Jennifer)
July 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER granting 144 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Nancy Claire Abernathy terminated as counsel for MasterCard International Inc. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 7/29/09. (ch, )
July 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 144 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney N. Claire Abernathy by MasterCard International Incorp.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
July 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 143 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Green Dot, Corp. identifying Corporate Parent None for Green Dot, Corp.. (Thames, Earl)
July 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ***WITHDRAWN PER ORDER # 172*** MOTION to Dismiss by Green Dot, Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Thames, Earl) Modified on 8/14/2009 (ch, ).
July 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 141 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Enable Holdings, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent None for Enable Holdings, Inc.. (Findlay, Eric)
July 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER granting 137 Motion for Extension of Certain Deadlines. Deadlines are set forth herein. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 7/15/09. (ch, )
July 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER granting 135 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 128 MOTION to Dismiss Responses due by 8/4/2009. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 7/15/09. (ch, )
July 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER granting 132 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 77 MOTION to Dismiss (Defendant Bank of America Corporation's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim) Responses due by 7/31/2009. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 7/15/09. (ch, )
July 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 137 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 101 MOTION to Dismiss Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(1), 12(B)(6), and 12(B)(7) by Actus, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William)
July 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Answer Due Deadline Updated for JP Morgan Chase & Co. to 8/7/2009. (ehs, )
July 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER granting 130 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. JP Morgan Chase & Co. have through and including August 7, 2009. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 7/14/09. (ehs, )
July 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 135 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 128 MOTION to Dismiss by Actus, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William)
July 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Answer Due Deadline Updated for M&T Bank Corporation to 8/9/2009. (ehs, )
July 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER granting 127 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant M&T Bank Corp. has through August 9, 2009 to respond to Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 7/13/09. (ehs, )
July 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER granting 125 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Plaintiff Actus, LLC may file its Response to MasterCard International, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Claims and Memorandum of Law in Support on or before July 31, 2009.Defendant MasterCard International, Inc. may file a Reply in Support of its Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Claims and Memorandum of Law in Support on or before August 21,2009. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 7/13/09. (ehs, )
July 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 132 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 77 MOTION to Dismiss (Defendant Bank of America Corporation's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim) by Actus, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William)
July 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 131 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric Wolf Pinker on behalf of Visa, Inc. (Pinker, Eric)
July 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 130 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by JP Morgan Chase & Co.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Yarbrough, Herbert)
July 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 129 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Capital One Financial Corporation (Gilstrap, James)
July 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ***WITHDRAWN PER ORDER # 172 *** MOTION to Dismiss by Capital One Financial Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gilstrap, James) Modified on 8/14/2009 (ch, ).
July 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 127 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 4 Amended Complaint by M&T Bank Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
July 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Defendant's Unopposed Third Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Google, Inc. to 8/24/2009. 45 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
July 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER granting 120 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 114 MOTION to Dismiss Responses due by 8/27/2009. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 7/9/09. (ch, )
July 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 125 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File by MasterCard International Incorp., Actus, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Abernathy, Nancy)
July 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Answer Due Deadline Updated for Sonic Solutions to 7/31/2009. (ch, )
July 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER granting 119 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Sonic Solutions deadline is extended to 7/31/09. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 7/9/09. (ch, )
July 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Answer Due Deadline Updated for Walt Disney Co to 8/5/2009. (ch, )
July 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER granting 118 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The Walt Disney Co. deadline is extended to 8/5/09. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 7/9/09. (ch, )
July 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 122 Defendant's Unopposed Third Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Google, Inc..( Gillam, Harry)
July 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Defendant's Unopposed Fourth Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Wal-Mart Stores Inc. to 8/7/2009. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ljw, )
July 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 121 Defendant's Unopposed Fourth Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Inc. Wal-Mart Stores.( Smith, Michael)
July 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 120 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 114 MOTION to Dismiss by Actus, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William)
July 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 119 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File (Unopposed) by Sonic Solutions. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Jennifer)
July 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 118 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 4 Amended Complaint by Walt Disney Co. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bunt, Robert)
June 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER granting 115 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Actus may file its Response to Defendants Motion to Dismiss on or before August 17, 2009. Vivendi may file a Reply on or before September 1, 2009. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 6/29/09. (ehs, )
June 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER granting 110 Motion for Extension of Time to File certain deadlines. Plaintiff Response to Visa Inc.s Motion to Dismiss on or before July 17, 2009. Defendant Visa Inc. may file a Reply in Support of its Motion to Dismiss on or before August 7, 2009. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 6/29/09. (ehs, )
June 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 115 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 104 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Claims and Memorandum of Law in Support by Actus, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William)
June 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ***WITHDRAWN PER ORDER # 172 *** MOTION to Dismiss by Enable Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Craft, Roger) Modified on 8/14/2009 (ch, ).
June 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 113 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Aaron A Barlow for Vivendi Universal S.A. and Vivendi Universal U.S. Holding Co. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-1-4776. (ch, )
June 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 112 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Benjamin J Bradford for Vivendi Universal S.A. and Vivendi Universal U.S. Holding Co. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-1-4776. (ch, )
June 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 111 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mark Edward Turk on behalf of Visa, Inc. (Turk, Mark)
June 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 110 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File by Visa, Inc., Actus, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order to Joint Motion to Extend)(Turk, Mark) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/25/2009: # 2 REVISED ORDER) (ch, ).
June 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 109 RESPONSE to 75 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Actus, LLC. (Davis, William)
June 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 108 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Luann Loraine Simmons for Google, Inc. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-1-4757. (ch, )
June 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 107 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Nora M Puckett for Google, Inc.. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-1-4757(ch, )
June 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 106 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Stephen J Akerley for Google, Inc. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-1-4757. (ch, )
June 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 105 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney David S Almeling for Google, Inc. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-1-4757. (ch, )
June 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 104 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Claims and Memorandum of Law in Support by Vivendi Universal S.A., Vivendi Universal U.S. Holding Co.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Heartfield, J)
June 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Defendant's Unopposed Third Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Inc. Wal-Mart Stores to 7/9/2009. 17 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ljw, )
June 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 103 Defendant's Unopposed Third Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.(Smith, Michael)
June 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 102 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Visa, Inc. (Micallef, Joseph A)
June 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ***WITHDRAWN PER ORDER # 172 *** MOTION to Dismiss Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(1), 12(B)(6), and 12(B)(7) by Visa, Inc.. Responses due by 6/29/2009 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Micallef, Joseph A) Modified on 8/14/2009 (ch, ).
June 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Answer Due Deadline Updated for M&T Bank Corporation to 7/10/2009. (ch, )
June 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER granting 97 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. M & T Bank Corp. deadline is extended to 7/10/09. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 6/11/09. (ch, )
June 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Answer Due Deadline Updated for Enable Holdings, Inc. to 7/17/2009. (ch, )
June 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER granting 94 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Enable Holdings, Inc deadline is extended to 7/17/09. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 6/11/09. (ch, )
June 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Google, Inc. to 7/10/2009. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ljw, )
June 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 98 RESPONSE to 55 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Actus, LLC. (Davis, William)
June 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 97 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 4 Amended Complaint by M&T Bank Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
June 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 96 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Lora Mitchell Friedemann for Enable Holdings, Inc. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-1-4741. (ch, )
June 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 95 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Google, Inc..( Gillam, Harry)
June 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 94 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Enable Holdings, Inc.'s , or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff Actus, LLC's First Amended Complaint for Patent Infringement by Enable Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric) Modified on 6/11/2009 (ljw, ).
June 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Answer Due Deadline Updated for Sonic Solutions to 7/10/2009. (ch, )
June 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER granting 88 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Sonic Solutions deadline is extended to 7/10/09. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 6/9/09. (ch, )
June 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER granting 86 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Defendant MasterCard International, Inc. may file a Reply in Support of its Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Claims Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B) (1), 12 (B)(6) and 12(B)(7) and Memorandum of Law in Support on or before August 7, 2009. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 6/9/09. (ch, )
June 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER granting 85 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 77 MOTION to Dismiss (Defendant Bank of America Corporation's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim) Responses due by 7/20/2009. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 6/9/09. (ch, )
June 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Answer Due Deadline Updated for JP Morgan Chase & Co. to 7/17/2009. (ch, )
June 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER granting 84 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. JP Morgan Chase & Co deadline is extended to 7/17/09. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 6/9/09. (ch, )
June 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 89 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Meta Financial Group, Inc. (Barr, John)
June 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Capital One Financial Corporation to 7/13/2009. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
June 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 88 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 4 Amended Complaint by Sonic Solutions. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Jennifer)
June 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 87 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Capital One Financial Corporation.( Gilstrap, James)
June 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 86 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File by MasterCard International Incorp., Actus, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Abernathy, Nancy)
June 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 85 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 77 MOTION to Dismiss (Defendant Bank of America Corporation's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim) by Actus, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William)
June 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 84 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by JP Morgan Chase & Co.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Yarbrough, Herbert)
June 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Walt Disney Co to 7/8/2009. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
June 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 83 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Walt Disney Co.( Bunt, Robert)
June 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 82 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Eric Faragi for MasterCard International Incorp. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-1-4732. (ch, )
June 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 81 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Eliot D Williams for MasterCard International Incorp. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-1-4731. (ch, )
June 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 80 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Robert C Scheinfeld for MasterCard International Incorp. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-1-4730. (ch, )
June 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Inc. Wal-Mart Stores to 6/19/2009. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
June 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 79 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. (Smith, Michael)
June 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 78 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Bank of America Corp. (Wille, David)
June 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ***WITHDRAWN PER ORDER # 172 *** MOTION to Dismiss (Defendant Bank of America Corporation's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim) by Bank of America Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Wille, David) Modified on 8/14/2009 (ch, ).
June 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 76 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Obopay, Inc. (Villarreal, Jose)
June 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ANSWER to 4 Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Actus, LLC by Obopay, Inc..(Villarreal, Jose)
June 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 74 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Actus, LLC. WildTangent, Inc. served on 4/17/2009, answer due 5/29/2009. (ehs, )
June 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 73 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Actus, LLC. Inc. Wal-Mart Stores served on 4/15/2009, answer due 6/4/2009. (ehs, )
June 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 72 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Actus, LLC. Vivendi Universal U.S. Holding Co. served on 4/27/2009, answer due 6/17/2009. (ehs, )
June 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 71 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Actus, LLC. Visa, Inc. served on 4/17/2009, answer due 6/12/2009. (ehs, )
June 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 70 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Actus, LLC. Sonic Solutions served on 4/21/2009, answer due 6/10/2009. (ehs, )
June 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 69 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Actus, LLC. Western Union served on 4/17/2009, answer due 5/7/2009. (ehs, )
June 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 68 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Actus, LLC. Walt Disney Co served on 4/17/2009, answer due 6/8/2009. (ehs, )
June 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 67 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Actus, LLC. Obopay, Inc. served on 4/15/2009, answer due 6/4/2009. (ehs, )
June 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 66 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Actus, LLC. M&T Bank Corporation served on 4/14/2009, answer due 6/10/2009. (ehs, )
June 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 65 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Actus, LLC. MasterCard International, LLC served on 4/15/2009, answer due 6/4/2009. (ehs, )
June 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 64 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Actus, LLC. JP Morgan Chase & Co. served on 4/27/2009, answer due 6/17/2009. (ehs, )
June 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 63 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Actus, LLC. Google, Inc. served on 4/20/2009, answer due 6/10/2009. (ehs, )
June 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 62 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Actus, LLC. Enable Holdings, Inc. served on 4/17/2009, answer due 6/17/2009. (ehs, )
June 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 61 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Actus, LLC. Capital One Financial Corporation served on 4/22/2009, answer due 6/11/2009. (ehs, )
June 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 60 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Actus, LLC. Bank of America Corp. served on 4/15/2009, answer due 6/4/2009. (ehs, )
June 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 59 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by MasterCard International, LLC (Abernathy, Nancy)
June 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ***WITHDRAWN PER ORDER # 172 *** MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(1), 12(B)(6), and 12(B)(7) and Memorandum of Law in Support by MasterCard International, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Abernathy, Nancy) Modified on 8/14/2009 (ch, ).
June 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 57 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jose Carlos Villarreal on behalf of Obopay, Inc. (Villarreal, Jose)
May 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 56 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by WildTangent, Inc. (Villarreal, Jose)
May 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ANSWER to 4 Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Actus, LLC by WildTangent, Inc..(Villarreal, Jose)
May 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Enable Holdings, Inc. to 6/17/2009. 41 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
May 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 54 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric Hugh Findlay on behalf of Enable Holdings, Inc. (Findlay, Eric)
May 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 53 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint filed by Enable Holdings, Inc..( Findlay, Eric)
May 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 52 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Joseph J Richetti for Inc. Wal-Mart Stores. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-1-4708) (ehs, )
May 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 51 RESPONSE to 29 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Actus, LLC. (Davis, William)
May 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 50 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jennifer Parker Ainsworth on behalf of Sonic Solutions (Ainsworth, Jennifer)
May 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 49 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Joseph A Micallef for Visa, Inc. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-1-4690. (ch, )
May 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 48 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney David P Gersch for Visa, Inc.. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-1-4689(ch, )
May 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 47 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Scott M Border for Visa, Inc.. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-1-4688(ch, )
May 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 46 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Matthew N Bathon for Visa, Inc.. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-1-4687(ch, )
May 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 45 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Debra Elaine Gunter on behalf of JP Morgan Chase & Co. (Gunter, Debra)
May 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for M&T Bank Corporation to 6/10/2009. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
May 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 44 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re M&T Bank Corporation.( Jones, Michael)
May 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting 40 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Douglas Ray McSwane, Jr terminated as counsel for Sonic Solutions. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 5/13/09. (ch, )
May 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for JP Morgan Chase & Co. to 6/17/2009. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
May 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 42 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re JP Morgan Chase & Co..( Yarbrough, Herbert)
May 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 41 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Herbert A Yarbrough, III on behalf of JP Morgan Chase & Co. (Yarbrough, Herbert)
May 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Google, Inc. to 6/10/2009. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
May 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 40 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Sonic Solutions. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McSwane, Douglas)
May 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Answer Due Deadline Updated for Visa, Inc. to 6/12/2009. (ch, )
May 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting 37 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. VISA Inc. shall have until June 12, 2009 to file an answer or otherwise respond to Complaint filed by Actus, LLC. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 5/11/09. (ch, )
May 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Google, Inc..( Gillam, Harry)
May 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 37 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 4 Amended Complaint by Visa, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Agreed Order)(Lynn, Michael)
May 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Capital One Financial Corporation to 6/11/2009. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
May 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 36 Defendant's Unopposed Amended Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Capital One Financial Corporation.( Gilstrap, James)
May 8, 2009 Opinion or Order ***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 35, Motion for Extension of Time. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (USED WRONG EVENT, NEED TO FILE UNDER APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME)(ch, )
May 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ***FILED IN ERROR. USED WRONG EVENT. PLEASE IGNORE.*** MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (Amended) by Capital One Financial Corporation. (Gilstrap, James) Modified on 5/8/2009 (ch, ).
May 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 34 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Brian M Buroker for Capital One Financial Corporation. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-1-4675) (ehs, )
May 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 33 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Justin T Arbes for Capital One Financial Corporation. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-1-4675) (ehs, )
May 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 32 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney David A Roodman for Inc. Wal-Mart Stores. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-1-4671 (ch, )
May 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 31 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Phillip L Sampson, Jr on behalf of Meta Financial Group, Inc. (Sampson, Phillip)
May 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 30 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher Aaron Shield on behalf of Meta Financial Group, Inc. (Shield, Christopher)
May 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ANSWER to 4 Amended Complaint for Patent Infringement, COUNTERCLAIM against Actus, LLC by Meta Financial Group, Inc..(Barr, John)
May 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Sonic Solutions to 6/10/2009. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
May 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Defendant Sonic Solutions' Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint.( McSwane, Douglas)
May 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Vivendi Universal S.A. to 6/17/2009; Vivendi Universal U.S. Holding Co. to 6/17/2009. Approximately 30 days Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
May 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Vivendi Universal U.S. Holding Co..( Heartfield, J)
May 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Vivendi Universal S.A..( Heartfield, J)
May 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 25 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by J Thad Heartfield on behalf of Vivendi Universal S.A., Vivendi Universal U.S. Holding Co. (Heartfield, J)
May 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Capital One Financial Corporation to 5/22/2009. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
May 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher Scott Storm on behalf of Bank of America Corp. (Storm, Christopher)
May 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Walt Disney Co to 6/8/2009. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
May 5, 2009 Opinion or Order ***FILED IN ERROR, PDF NOT LEGIBLE, ATTY HAS REFILED (SEE #22). Document # 21, Application to extend time. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (sm, )
May 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Capital One Financial Corporation.( Gilstrap, James)
May 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Defendant's Unopposed First (refiled) Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Walt Disney Co.( Hardin, Roy)
May 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ***FILED IN ERROR, PDF NOT LEGIBLE***Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Walt Disney Co.( Hardin, Roy) Modified on 5/5/2009 (sm, ).
May 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Inc. Wal-Mart Stores to 6/4/2009. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
May 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.(Smith, Michael)
April 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Bank of America Corp. to 6/4/2009. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
April 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for WildTangent, Inc.. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
April 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Bank of America Corp..( Bhavsar, Samir)
April 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for WildTangent, Inc. to 5/29/2009. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
April 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for MasterCard International, LLC to 6/4/2009. First Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
April 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re WildTangent, Inc..( Villarreal, Jose)
April 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re MasterCard International, LLC.( Abernathy, Nancy)
April 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Samir A Bhavsar on behalf of Bank of America Corp. (Bhavsar, Samir)
April 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David G Wille on behalf of Bank of America Corp. (Wille, David)
April 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 14 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Scott McMillan for Western Union. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-1-4647 (ch, )
April 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 13 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney David E Sipiora for Western Union. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-1-4647 (ch, )
April 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Obopay, Inc. to 6/4/2009. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
April 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Obopay, Inc..( Tyler, Marvin)
April 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 11 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Green Dot, Corp.. (ch, )
April 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daymon Jeffrey Rambin on behalf of MasterCard International, LLC (Rambin, Daymon)
April 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nancy Claire Abernathy on behalf of MasterCard International, LLC (Abernathy, Nancy)
April 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Elizabeth L DeRieux on behalf of MasterCard International, LLC (DeRieux, Elizabeth)
April 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sidney Calvin Capshaw, III on behalf of MasterCard International, LLC (Capshaw, Sidney)
April 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 6 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Visa, Inc., Vivendi Universal U.S. Holding Co.. (Attachments: # 1 Vivendi Universal US Holdings Co)(ch, )
April 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Davis, William)
April 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended Complaint against all defendants, filed by Actus, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Davis, William)
April 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Magistrate Consent Form Mailed to Actus, LLC (ch, )
April 9, 2009 Opinion or Order E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to MasterCard International, LLC, Meta Financial Group, Inc., M&T Bank Corporation, Obopay, Inc., Sonic Solutions, Visa, Inc., Vivendi Universal S.A., Inc. Wal-Mart Stores, Walt Disney Co, Western Union, WildTangent, Inc., AgileCo, Bank of America Corp., Blaze Mobile, Inc., Capital One Financial Corporation, Enable Holdings, Inc., Google, Inc., Green Dot, Corp., Javien Digital Payment Solutions, Inc., JP Morgan Chase & Co.. (ch, )
April 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Actus, LLC (Davis, William)
April 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Case Assigned to Judge T. John Ward. (ch, )
April 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1 ORIGINAL COMPLAINT against all defendants (Filing fee $ 350. Receipt # 05400000000001951781), filed by Actus, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet)(ch, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Actus, LLC v. Bank of America Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Actus, LLC
Represented By: William Ellsworth Davis, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blaze Mobile, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Financial Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enable Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Green Dot, Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Javien Digital Payment Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase & Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MasterCard International, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meta Financial Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M&T Bank Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Obopay, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonic Solutions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Visa, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vivendi Universal S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inc. Wal-Mart Stores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walt Disney Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WildTangent, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AgileCo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?